Sitts et al v. Weaver
Plaintiff: Julius Leonard, Jr., Robert Payne, Anthony Boyd, Steven Barrows, Daniel Schultz, Bryan Ruple, James C. Sitts, Robert J. Giordano, Anthony Hopper, Richard Grantt and Nicholas Meridv
Defendant: Alan Weaver and Delaware County Correctional Facility
Case Number: 9:2020cv01474
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 18 MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE: The # 13 Text Order that was sent to Robert Payne at Delaware County Correctional Facility was returned undeliverable. Envelope marked: "Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward". (rep)
January 26, 2021 Filing 17 MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE: The # 13 Text Order that was sent to Anthony Hopper at Delaware County Correctional Facility was returned undeliverable. Envelope marked: "Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward". (rep)
January 26, 2021 Filing 16 MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE: The # 13 Text Order that was sent to Nicholas Meridv at Delaware County Correctional Facility was returned undeliverable. Envelope marked: "Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward". (rep)
January 26, 2021 Filing 15 MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE: The # 13 Text Order that was sent to Anthony Boyd at Delaware County Correctional Facility was returned undeliverable. Envelope marked: "Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward". (rep)
January 26, 2021 Filing 14 MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE: The # 13 Text Order that was sent to Steven Barrows at Delaware County Correctional Facility was returned undeliverable. Envelope marked: "Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward". (rep)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: On January 14, 2021, the Court received plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Dkt. No. #12 . Because plaintiff has complied with Rule 41(a)(1) (A)(i), the Clerk is respectfully directed to TERMINATE plaintiff Sitts from this action as a party. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(B), all claims asserted by plaintiff Sitts are DISMISSED without prejudice. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 1/15/2021. (Copy served upon all plaintiffs via regular mail) (sal)
January 14, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of voluntary dismissal from James C. Sitts (nas, ).
January 14, 2021 Filing 11 MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE: The #5 Order that was sent to Robert Payne at Delaware Correctional Facility was returned undeliverable. Envelope marked: "Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward." (rep)
January 14, 2021 Filing 10 MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE: The #5 Order that was sent to Nicholas Meridv at Delaware Correctional Facility was returned undeliverable. Envelope marked: "Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward." (rep)
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE: The #5 Order that was sent to Anthony Hopper at Delaware Correctional Facility was returned undeliverable. Envelope marked: "Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward." (rep)
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE: The #5 Order that was sent to Anthony Boyd at Delaware Correctional Facility was returned undeliverable. Envelope marked: "Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward." (rep) Modified on 1/14/2021 (rep, ).
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE: The #5 Order that was sent to Steven Barrows at Delaware Correctional Facility was returned undeliverable. Envelope marked: "Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward." (rep)
January 6, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER: Filed by James Sitts, dated January 3, 2021, requesting a copy of his Complaint. {Copy of the #1 Complaint sent to the plaintiff via regular mail}. (rep)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECISION AND ORDER that plaintiff Sitts' first IFP application (Dkt. No. #2 ) is DENIED as incomplete. Plaintiff Sitts' second IFP application (Dkt. No. #4 ) is GRANTED. Before the Court reviews the sufficiency of the complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and/or 28 U.S.C. 1915A, plaintiffs Barrows, Leonard, Ruple, Schultz, Meridv, Giordano, Grantt, Payne, Hopper, Boyd must individually, within 30 days of the date of this Decision and Order, either (a) pay the Court's filing fee of $402.00 in full or (b) submit a completed and signed IFP application in accordance with this Decision and Order and a signed inmate authorization form reflecting his individual consent to pay the $350.000 filing fee over time, in installments. If, within the time period specified above, any of the plaintiffs fail to comply with the terms of this Decision and Order delineated above, the non-compliant individual will be terminated from the docket and any claims asserted by that non-compliant individual will be dismissed from the action without prejudice without further Order of this Court. Upon full compliance with this Decision and Order, or at the expiration of the deadline to comply, whichever is earlier, the Clerk shall return this file to the Court for further review. In accordance with the Rule 10.1(c)(2) of the Court's Local Rules, plaintiffs shall promptly notify the Clerk's Office and all parties or their counsel, in writing, of any change in their address. Plaintiffs' failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this Decision and Order, as well as a blank IFP application and blank inmate authorization form, on each plaintiff (except plaintiff Sitts) in accordance with the Local Rules of Practice for this Court. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 1/6/2021. (Notice of Compliance Deadline 2/5/2021, Case Review Deadline 3/8/2021) (Attachments: #1 Blank IFP Application Form, #2 Inmate Authorization Form)(Copy of this order served on all plaintiffs via regular mail. Blank IFP and inmate authorization forms sent to all plaintiffs w/ exception of Sitts via regular mail). (sal )
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION: For Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by James C. Sitts. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter and Mailing Envelope)(rep) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/15/2020 with redacted version) (rep).
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by James C. Sitts. (nas, )
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James C. Sitts.(nas, )
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alan Weaver filed by Daniel Schultz, Anthony Hopper, Steven Barrows, Nicholas Meridv, Richard Grantt, Anthony Boyd, Robert J. Giordano, James C. Sitts, Julius Leonard, Jr, Robert Payne, Bryan Ruple. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 envelope)(nas )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sitts et al v. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Leonard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Barrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Ruple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Sitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Hopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Grantt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Meridv
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware County Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?