Hasan v. Rich
Petitioner: Haithem Hasan
Respondent: John G. Rich
Case Number: 9:2021cv01285
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jodi A. Danzig on behalf of John G. Rich (Danzig, Jodi)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED, that petitioner's request to file an enlarged memorandum of law, Dkt. No. #2 , is GRANTED. ORDERED, that the Clerk serve copies of this Decision and Order and the petition upon respondent and the Attorney General of the State of New York in accordance with Section XIII, Rule 1.1(d) of the Local Rules. ORDERED, that the respondent shall file and serve an answer to the petition, and provide the Court with the relevant records, within ninety (90) days of the date of this Decision and Order. ORDERED, that petitioner may, but is not required to, file a reply within thirty (30) daysof the filing date of respondent's answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on December 8, 2021. (Attachments: #1 petition, #2 memo of law)[response due by John G. Rich served on 12/8/2021, answer due 3/8/2022]{served as directed} (nas)
December 3, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number SYR060126 (nas, )
December 2, 2021 Filing 3 State Court Records filed by Haithem Hasan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) B, #2 Exhibit(s) C, #3 Exhibit(s) D, #4 Exhibit(s) E, #5 Exhibit(s) F, #6 Exhibit(s) G, #7 Exhibit(s) H, #8 Exhibit(s) I, #9 Exhibit(s) J, #10 Exhibit(s) K, #11 Exhibit(s) L, #12 Exhibit(s) M, #13 Exhibit(s) N, #14 Exhibit(s) N (2ND HALF), #15 Exhibit(s) O, #16 Exhibit(s) P, #17 Exhibit(s) Q, #18 Exhibit(s) R)(nas )
December 2, 2021 Filing 2 Letter Motion from Haithem Hasan requesting to exceed the twenty-five page limit for memorandum of law. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(nas)
December 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Haithem Hasan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 cover letter)(nas )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hasan v. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Haithem Hasan
Represented By: Brian Shiffrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John G. Rich
Represented By: Jodi A. Danzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?