Acosta v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Alfaro Acosta
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 9:2022cv01259
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Documents sent to the USAO per the #7 Decision and Order.) (meb)
December 20, 2022 Filing 8 Notification to Superintendent of Filing - Provided Warden at RAY BROOK FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION with notice of instant action and a copy of Plaintiff's #5 Inmate Authorization Form. USDC/NYND Finance Dept notified. (meb)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECISION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's in forma pauperis application (Dkt. No. #4 ) is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk provide the Warden of the facility, designated by plaintiff as his current location, with a copy of plaintiff's inmate authorization form, and notify the official that this action has been filed and that plaintiff is required to pay the entire statutory filing fee of $350.00 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court provide a copy of plaintiff's inmate authorization form to the Financial Deputy of the Clerk's Office; and it is further ORDERED that the FTCA claim against the United States survives the Court's sua sponte review under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A and requires a response; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue summonses and forward them, along with copies of the complaint, to the United States Marshal, for service on the United States Attorney for the Northern District of New York ("U.S. Attorney's Office"), the Attorney General of the United States in Washington, D.C. and the Federal Bureau of Prisons in Washington, D.C. in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk shall also forward a copy of this Order to the U.S. Attorneys Office; and it is further ORDERED that defendant or counsel, shall file a response to the complaint as provided for in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 12/20/2022. (Copy served via regular mail)(meb)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 12/12/2022. (Copy served via regular mail)(meb)
December 12, 2022 Filing 5 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM filed by Wilfredo Alfaro Acosta. (meb)
December 12, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wilfredo Alfaro Acosta. (Mailing envelope included)(meb)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP application is DENIED as incomplete; and it is further ORDERED that, because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action; and it is further ORDERED that if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, (1) either (a) pay the $402.00 filing fee in full, or (b) submit a completed and signed IFP application; AND (2) submit a completed and signed inmate authorization form; and it is further ORDERED that, upon plaintiff's compliance with this Order, the Clerk shall reopen the action and forward it to the Court for review; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order on plaintiff along with a blank IFP application and a blank inmate authorization form. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 12/1/2022. (Copy served via regular mail, along with blank forms)(meb)
November 28, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wilfredo Alfaro Acosta.(meb)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Wilfredo Alfaro Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter and mailing envelope)(meb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Alfaro Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?