Oudekerk v. Doe #1 et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Oudekerk
Defendant: Doe #1, Doe #2, Doe #3, Doe #4 and Doe #5
Case Number: 9:2024cv00113
Filed: January 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Mitchell J Katz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2024 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT regarding valentin order by Doe #1, Doe #2, Doe #3, Doe #4, Doe #5. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of service)(Galus, Alexandra)
February 29, 2024 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION OF FILING TO NYS ATTORNEY GENERAL: Copies of #1 Complaint, #7 Order, sent electronically to the NYS Attorney General Office as directed by the Court. Status Report due by 3/29/2024. (Attachments: #1 copy of complaint)(nas )
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Section 1983 official capacity claims seeking money damages are DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b) as barred by the Eleventh Amendment. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment excessive force claims against Corrections Officers John Doe #1-5 SURVIVE sua sponte review. ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Decision and Order on the New York State Attorney General's Office by electronic mail. The New York State Attorney General's Office is hereby requested, to the extent possible, to produce the information specified above regarding the identities of Corrections Officers John Doe #1-5 within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Decision and Order. Upon receipt of a response from the New York State Attorney General's Office, as directed above, the Clerk shall return this file to the Court for further review. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on February 29, 2024. {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas )
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Judge David N. Hurd on February 6, 2024. {text order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas )
February 5, 2024 Filing 5 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Nicholas Oudekerk. (nas )
February 5, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nicholas Oudekerk(nas )
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP application is DENIED as incomplete. ORDERED that, because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, (1) either (a) pay the $405.00 filing fee in full, or (b) submit a completed and signed IFP application; AND (2) submit a completed and signed inmate authorization form. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on January 25, 2024. {order and blank forms served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas)
January 23, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nicholas Oudekerk[only page 1 received](nas ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2024: #1 Proposed Summons) (nas, ).
January 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Doe #1, Doe #2, Doe #3, Doe #4, Doe #5 filed by Nicholas Oudekerk. (Attachments: #1 in support of claims, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 envelope)(nas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oudekerk v. Doe #1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Oudekerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?