Cesar Mateo v. Superintendent Robert Ercole et al
Plaintiff: Cesar Mateo
Defendant: Robert Ercole, G. Williams and M. Kasper
Case Number: 1:2008cv10450
Filed: December 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Dutchess
Presiding Judge: William H. Pauley
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons that follow, the Court converts defendants motion to one for summary judgment and grants the converted motion. Defendants have adequately demonstrated that Mateo failed to exhaust his administrative r emedies before filing suit in federal court, and plaintiff has not plausibly explained why any exception to exhaustion should apply. For the reasons given above, the action is dismissed without prejudice. In the event that the plaintiff has exhausted or does exhaust his administrative remedies fully, he may refile his complaint and reinstitute his suit. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/16/2010) (jfe) Modified on 9/17/2010 (jfe).
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the telephone conference scheduled for June 16, 2009, is hereby rescheduled to June 23, 2009, at 10:00 am. The office of the Attorney General shall make arrangements for Plaintiff to participate in a telephone conference call with the Court, at that time, with respect to all of the above-captioned cases, and shall initiate that call to my chambers. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 6/10/2009) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(jpo)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, that as to the cases 08-10450 and 08-11093, the Court's Pro Se Office is directed to arrange for the issuance of a Supplemental Summons, and to provide Plaintiff with a copy of the Complaint, Supplemental Summons, and to provide Plaintiff with a copy of the Complaint, Supplemental Summons...Plaintiff's time to serve Defendants in these cases, pursuant to FRCP 4(m), is extended to 5/29/09. As to the cases of 08-8797 and 08-7779, discovery shall be stayed pending service of proces s on Defendants in the cases referred to in paragraph 1, above. The Office of the Attorney General shall make arrangements for Plaintiff to participate in a telephone conference call with the Court on 6/16/09, at 10:00 am, with respect to all of the above-captioned cases, and shall initiate that call to my chambers on that date. ( Service due by 5/29/2009., Telephone Conference set for 6/16/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 4/3/09) Copies sent by chambers.(cd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cesar Mateo v. Superintendent Robert Ercole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Kasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?