Pippins et al v. KPMG LLP Featured Case
Plaintiff: Andrew Rehm, Anna Huang, Brian J. Cogley, Irina Brimmell, Vanessa Burns, Jamie Schindler, Alisha Brumbaugh, Jennifer L. Arthur, Thomas F. Lisnich, Shirley Suet Wai So, Timothy DeLuca, Krysten M. Genaway, Emily Diane Towers, Constance Onyiah, Leslie Ellen Davis, William S. Lockard III, Daniel Mattar, Chase Michael Gardner, Brianna R. Truex, Domenico Pontrelli, Michael Ian Tarrant, Stephanie T. Unkart, Jovan Tucker, John Hays, Stacie M. Onken, Orealis Marie Alvarado, Joseph Kaufman, Daniel Chen, Sara Lee, Dalia Klimkowski, Gregory Goldsand, Alexander J. Gilbertson, Annette Sabrina Williams, Zachary A. Schamaun, Pamela S. Lee, David Charles Robertson, Leigh Anne Rozycki, Brian Edward Capstick, Brett E. Kirkland, Jill N. Minshew, Laura Ann Westenberg, Hyangsoon Lee, Sarah Tucker Mahar, Robert G. Pyrz, Jennifer Thompson (Peter), Jeffrey W. Barlam, Olga Martynov, Jeffrey Bland, Myla N. Chatman, Bond N. Ferguson (Munson), Amy A. Hillenbrand, Jesus Comendeiro, Zahra J. Castillo, Mathew S. Hanley, Justin T. Maier, Kimberly C. Conner, Steven Oscarson, Michael Yoo, Douglas D. Martine, Alyson P. LeDesky, Nathaniel Edelman, Constance Leung, Kate Pinney, Matthew D. Ytzen, Paul W. Kemp, Bradley K. Jastrow, Brooke A. Ballance, Jessica R. Beckendorf, David Ha, Michelle L. Mysuna, Drew Harris Rosen, Aiman M. Wahdan, Virginia Grzenia, Joey Rodriguez, Gregory S. Torbic, Edward A. Valentino, Michael D. Coriell, Yelena Glants, Kevin (Keun) W. Pak, Anna Sheynkman Gorin, LeShawd T. Thompson, Trisha Lewis Martin, Bryan A. Keele, Christine L. Blaylock, Leif E. Bergquist, Adam Travis, Michael D. Pick, Allison Leigh Moore, Nicole M. Anderson, Carli Kisaba, Jared Brice Filus, James A. Dorey, Alex Cook, Karen L. Juan, Zachariah Cooper, Cesaria Rutigliano, Mitchell A. Melfi, Reuben Abitbol, Danielle L. Cahill, Rebecca A. Krammen, Maile M. Lewis, Christopher D. Bushey, Savannah Lehman, Adam Joseph Van De leuv, Jennifer L. Howell, Wakana Kamesato Sebacher, Emma Colacicco, Sarah Koneman, Vanyna M. Louis, Erica A. Goode, Steven Gaul, Christopher A Marino, Terese V. Strehlow, Neil Shah, Stacey Gill, Brent E. Arnold, Felicia Brenner, Ryan M. Swaner, Kevin Bekas, Sarah R. Sims, Lauren M. Brown, Corey Jones, Michael Weichholz, Dosanna Wu, Katlin A. Mick, Thomas X. Yao, Noah Sullum, Amanda B. Kane, Jae Y. Chung, Katherine A. Sweet, Ryan J. Keys, Dominica Barber, Hui Zhi, Sara A. Lasek, Heather Moreland, Amy Hertz, Edmund Tong, Seville Nicole Christmas, Sandra Rak, Kristine P. Somera, Richard S. Seger III, Stephanie M. Adams, Angela Yu, Anthony Kimani, Steven Murphey, Satomi Takahashi, Megan E. Toms (Humber), Matthew Mills, Lela Mujakovic, Stephen Boscola, Patrick A. Thompson, Justin N. Beebe, Andrew T. Cox, Vera Zhuravleva, Nichole A. Serino, Kayla L. Barrett, Sergio D. Ramos, Elizabeth M. Simmons, Rongchen Chen, Melissa Stokes, Richard N. Tinelli, Kristen N. Kelly, David Jalette, Johnathan Marr, Yi Zou, Parissa Hannah Daneshmand, Daniel N. Marrone, Mark A. DeBonee, Pedro Laborde Muniz, Paul Thomas Morrone, Kevin M. Olkowski, Laurie Chen, Trent C. Brown, Leslie L Perrine, Briana G. Bishop, Allison K. Sanden, Melissa McQueen Curl, Jennifer Lai, Jenna H. Karmel, Sarah L. Luna, Melissa Brownfield (Luiso), Erin Diffley, Hermine Barseghian, Aaron D. Goodman, Tamara R. Hook, Jeremy R. Johnson, Timothy D. Long, Rachel M. English, Samantha D. Leonard, Tiffany Chua Chan, Matthew A. Pitetti, David Kang, Heidi Smilde, Emily R. Boriack, Erin Elizabeth Donia, Matthew Wenzel, Michael Crnkovich, Erin M. Everly, John P. Harris, David Koehler, Uyen Tran, Nathan Edward Bertsch, Joshua Adam Mandelberger, Javonna E. James, Jennifer M. Peyton, Jonathan Wiener, Katie L. Thomas (Jackson), Donald Richard Karr, Yu-Han Lo, Trevor D. McKendrick, Brian Edward Stamile, Andrea Henry (Speck), Marc Ryan Fillari, Stephen Marsala, Jr., Leslie Jordan, Ari Michael Baruch, Thomas P. Keegan, William S. Tierno, AnnMarie Stuart, Christina Marjorie Panageotou, Karima Warner, Elissa Sheryl Yorgey, Matthew Skellan, Adesuwa Asemota, David Freund, Megan R. Gilbertson, Tameka L. Hammond, Josef H. Farbstein, Bogdan Milin, Meng Lor, Samantha Anderegg-Botichi, Katherine R. Johnston, Brian S. Zalewski, Brent Vetter, Brandon Gemoll, Matthew R. Griffin, Julian Joaquin Murrieta, David C. Whitney, Randy R. Placzek, Amy H. Brousse, Wieslawa Jamroz, Amanda Menniti, Daniel Huey, David J. Murray, Benjamin Jurgens, William B. Ross, Ethan J. Giller, David S. Guy, Merlyn A. Kushner, Benjamin D. Goode, Katrinaca E. Ware, Elizabeth D. Brown, Jessica Leigh Williams, Benjamin B. Anderson, Shirley Jean Criddle, Samantha Zimmer, Michael W. Derington, Jenni L. Dollahon, Jonathan DeBeaumont, Lauren Goldfarb, Neil Thomas Punt, Laura Rath, Jessica R. Preston, Lina Wang, Mark Preston Brough, Vincent Pisano, Joe Manuel Guerrero, Thosana Tan, Andrew J. Terreri, Maya E. Procinsky, Samuel A. Kuznetzoff, Ryan D. Carr, Mark M. Ulrich, Atul Prasad Adhikary, Vincente Figueroa, Kunal Dudheker, Erika Ryan Larson, Lacy R. Glaser, Brent E. McLaren, Heather Jean Reeves Prudhomme, William Baxter, Robert Vidal III, Mark Van Winter, Gregory Alan Morse, Joel B. Rintoul, Bryan Goldfinger, William Waits Raulerson, Caitlin A Tennant, Laura Westensee, John M. Jambers, Drew M. Biddle, Chad W. Wonderling, Mathew Roppo, Jacqueline Marie DeMeo, Donald Shaw, Michael D. DAntonio, Kyle Vitale, Del Ciela Basilio, Mark Nixdorf, James Rinaldi, Matthew B. Smith, Davona Kelly, Amanda Shatzman, Fay M. Richards, Melissa K. Langone, Ian Nichols, Eve Buckwalter, Kristen Chong, James W. Lee III, Tia Alisha Finn, Poonam Sakhrani, Sarah E. Callan Stanclift, Melissa S. Scalici, Bobbie Jo Emond, Zhen Su, Ivi Santoso, Ashley Johnson, Daniel T. McNevin, Chen Ni, Michelle D. Harris, Katherine A. Panzarella, Stephanie R. Conti, Dylan M. Johnson, Matthew A. Ross, Charles Conrad Boettger, Heather L. Hall, Valerie Tang, Luisana Bonilla OBrien, Kyle L. Fletcher, Ann Salinas, Justin S. Norton, Janine Joyce De Jesus, John Edward Glockzen, Jr., Galen P. Ward, Steven S. Merrill, Kenneth Ty, Paulette M. Heur, Jackson Y. Kuo, Sarah Vanlandingham, Jonathan W. Wright, Amanda J. Myers, Evan M. Dashe, Yaelle E. Bernstein, Sophia Chowdhury, Megan Erwin, Kevin D. Knipp, Jennifer D. Sing, Maya Abdulkarim, Alvaro Narvaez, Marcus A. Flynn, Ciara Marino, Justin M. Terzo, Sarah K. Lindholm, Maura Helberg Lange, Matthew Trinh, Christine Chiaramonte, David C. Orasin, Megan L. Opsahl, Jeniffer Shea Kratville, Brittany Nicole Lay, Shun Tung Lam, Angela Guerrero Willhoft, Leo A. Matz, Kelly Meriano, Laura Elizabeth Reynolds, Robert M. Merenda Jr., Zachary A. Kayser, Elisa Lee Hua Wu, Nicole Elizabeth Anderson, Meredith Rogers (McCarthy), Erik H. Olsgaard, Kelly Yi, Mia K. Sails, Ellen Volodarsky, Jillian Bernard, Jessica Erin Simpson, Rachel A. Stuart, Brian Ross Dout, Joelle M. Brown, Tracie Togami, Adrienne D. Tanker, Angela Wen-an Yu, Peter W. Wong, Kyle E. Langner, Natalie C. Cusat, Christopher Cacanindin, Damon T. Smith, Sophie Y. Malati, Krystle Tolentino, Takeo Uchida, Cristina Marie Del Buono, Michael Chiulli, Maria G. Trujillo, Jatinder Singh, Enoch Chung, Christine Sullivan (Fraga), Erin Elizabeth Hart, Holland Stimac, Paul Kreger, Jia Yin Wu, Allison Chen, Michael T. Visconto, Christopher K. Lee, Yulia Barland, Christopher Furlong, Tomoko Furukawa, James W. Forsythe, Holly C. Donley, Kyle V. Brown, Winly Vuong, Zhanna A. Freeman, Nicholas S. Winkler, Jeevanjit Singh, Bryan Davis, Sean A. McGovern, Jeremy P. Dugan, Jacob O. Tech, Patrick J. Garbani, Heather L. Boring, Max H. Essoh, David P. Grimner, Geneva Wigfall, Madison R. Duvall, Nathan Fedders, Lauren Danielle Caplan, Rebecca J. Mastarone (Elliott), Sumi Choi, Sreya S. Alex (Samuel), Jeffery V. Kent, Jr., Daniel J. Robertson, Robert Liu, Daniel Wullschleger, Thomas J. Chloe, Alan William Roeder, Jason Huisman, Artsiom Anisko, Joseph T. Leonard, Paul James DiCarlo, Li Liu, Tuan Pham, William L. Fine, Selena R. Bailey, Rachel Houdek, Michael L. Steele, Nina J. Aves, Marilyn Louis, Jordan A. Handsaker, Vanessa Angelin Castano, Kang Li, Crena E. Sprague, Morgan M. Pearson, Mai Endo, Kevin Ellis, Melissa L. Brown, Lauren Plumley, Kristie Davis Zapf, Gayle Robin Patasnik, Adam G. Avni, Christopher O. Weiss, Sunita Kumar, Melissa Gerdung, Pietro Maddalena, Caitlin C. Clark, Ebony Harris, Stephanie Pham, Mark Kramer, Jared Paul Neeley, Edward Diasio, Michael Dean Davis, Robert Redling, Kevin W. Young, Penelope Yurkovich (Normandin), Eric D. Mead, Shawn M. Parent, Jason T. Bailey, Megan Orr, Mohsan Khan, Jillian M. McCool, Hong F. Walrond, Saron H. Tegegne, Bryan Schroeder, Dean Mattera, Steven Calder, Kumiko Tanaka, Yuk N. Li, Keenan James McCullough, Daniel Hadi Tabib, Santo S. Gramando III, Patrick J. McCadden, Aren J. Cowan, James R. Taylor, Thomas J. Zubulake, James Douglas Nelson, Jessica Vavithes, Peggy Liu, Andrea S. Mosher, Adam Chrudimsky, Sean M. Paul, Justin B. Bobus, T'Lane B. Briggeman, Robert J. Miranda, Evan M Zawatsky, Kei Kuramoto, Kristen L. Muncie, Valerie T. Kaufman, Meghan R. Cooper, James D. McClelland, Jr., Nicole C. Doran, Michael Vahidtari, Jeffrey T. Wong, Priya Vasudevan, Ashley A. Darden, Ignatius Jackson, Kristen Burbank, Julie M. Knight, Ashley Rosanne Dwyer, Ailda Alushi, Rainy Leforce Spring, Kyle L. Alexander, Philip Tuinuku Smith, Nimish Patel, Rena Zarah, Lisa A. Bland (Horton), Kiera J. Watson, Evan R Parzych, Jeremy D. Kline, Michelle M. Krause, Calvin Wu, Elizabeth H. Cunningham, Chipman R. Seale, Qiong Wang, Timothy McCormack, Ariel Taylor, Dawson Hale, Morgan Ann Frame, Philip Twede, Anna C. Gullickson, Jessica R. Conway, Karen E. Gorzynski, Vincent J. Passafiume, Kristen McFarland, Andrew Hardy, Yim Chi Cheng, Thu Lam, Vanita Katrina, Rohini R. Seth, David C. Scott, Maria Rivera, David Piatek, Taeook Kwon, Thai Trinh, Christopher A. Welch, Mona Aflatooni, Allison McGuire, Michael A. Levin, Tammie Fossaceca, Christopher Adam Wade, David Suh, Sean Schram, Ahn Romero, Kerry Ann Berg, Cody Parker, Winnie Chan, Nitin Mundra, Ronak Brahmbhatt, Kerri Blum, Sarah McCue, Ani Susan Menendian, Samantha S. Liao, Oscar Londono, Sho Chinen, Stephen Van Lyon, Janette Ricks, Theresa Khuu, Charity Nicole Lee, John R. Hamill III, John M. Schenk, Seth T. Fick, Myra S. Aslam, Chanelle Takemoto, Kristina M. Harrison, Jason R. Walter, Daniela Lundin, Cheryl Tripodi, Scott Rumberg, Amanda Authement, Jolene N. Rabena, Michelle S. Luk, Ankur B. Patel, Joseph Gentzkow, Joseph Decardi-Nelson, Daega Fatah, Eric Yee, Daniel P. Jensen, Prparime Limani, Xuejiao Jiang, Hua-Jung Yu, Christopher M. Chiaraluce, Jack Yi-Ping Tang, Jiesi Chen, Keiko Hirakawa, Janice Luo, Sharon Brickman, Chelsea Neale Collins, Wei Song, Daniel Parks, Kelly Price, Andrew J. Choly, Thomas M. Kerr III, Sue Yen Chong, April L. Doten, Amy Elizabeth Vogt, Daniel McCormick, Robert A. Miller, Trinity Marcia Mascola, Jana Milenky Weissman, Evelyn Chan, Jennifer Bai, Amanda K. Johnson, Ashley Phillips, Shane Huiberts, Shannon Lee Morrow, Joseph Gibson, Jennifer L. Johnson, Petruta L. Gantoi, Preston Jeung, Genna N. Love, Elliot Parks, Danielle A. McCoy, David Edward Feldman, Christine A. Reed, Phillip M. Heu-Weller, Noelle M. Carlo, Patrick Michael Funk, Eric M. Pannell, Logan J. Christianson, Kingman Chan, Jr., Nicholas A. Ebersole, Svetlana Condur, Rebecca Mosher, Paul R. Scott, Shelley Gulati, Jessica Marie Bushey, Jennifer Rios, Jenna N. Cofman, Leslie Keathley, Kristina Eng, Terryann A. Roberts, Robert S. Chun, Jing Tao, Ryan L. Christie, Lauren A. Morris, Kristopher Glaser, Stephen F. Endres, Adele M. Domingue, Christopher John Howe Collato, Marissa Mayhorn, Laura Davidson, Frank R. Sousa, Robert C. Thayer, William Robert Kraft, Daniel R. Sabet, Lauren Lippincott Darsey, Tania Rhanda Ahmad, Nathan E. Carlton, Juliet Lee Smith, Shannon Cunniffe, Joseph F. Franzone, Antoine Raie, Alison J. Moss, Xiu T. Khaw, Samantha M. Snyder (Lance), Lisa M. Morgado, Emilio Jorge Sartori, Christopher R. Dotson, Andrea Diaz, Ashley Peyton Disinger, Aliesha Nathu, Timothy I. Miller, Anthony C. Zaccarelli, Diana A. McArdle, Ashley S. Guthmann, Matthew Birmingham, Derek W. Richardson, Joshua D. Smith, Paul A. Larkins, James A. Bumbulsky, Brittany K. Hopp, Kelly B. Posten, Edmund A Windsor, Julian Paik, Zachary J. Pettinger, Matthew T. Haines, Sara R. Floreani, John Deng, Jamie Buenzow, Allison K. Slife (Hritz), Elijah McIntosh, Holly M. Saxby (Sowersby), Bradley T. Owens, Omar J. Nieves, Ronald Karroll, Jr., Dowling Burke Stough, Tyrone Guillory Jr., Yoana Allen, John M. Butler, Tyler J. Whitaker, John G. Estelle, Jonathan R. Warriner, Edward Freiwald, Alanna Cooper, Jessica H. Leonard, Ashley Tinnirella, Andrew Katz, Ann Patricia Salamunovich, Dylan Williams, Miki Nakazawa, Fadil Limani, Vivian K. Lau, Rondal Harris, Jr., Ian A. Ruddock, John M. Pontecorvo, Lucorin J. Mathis, Michael Santolucito, Luke Cletus Iverson, Sergey Tkachev, Xuemei Ren, Katsiaryna Tsybina, Kerry L. Blatt, Ny-Liang Wang, Jessica P Puckett, Su Zheng, Bryan Kyle Zerr, Derek P. Snikeris, Jaime Hinojosa, Priya Patel, Jacob Spear, Jonathan D. Leins, Alexander Vyshetsky, Michael L. Lembo, Brian Ascencio, Matthew C. Gadzinski, Olutosin Okunoren, Edward Demone, Kyle Joseph Chagnon, Craig McNeill, Danielle M. Roche (Duplessis), Christopher I. Strother, Connie M. Hu, Ashley Albers Austin, Denise Worsley, Connie Horng, Abby Griesedieck (Reeves), Justin B. Cook, Jessica H. Schatz, Jason Lalk, Jing Huang, Karishma Barua, Adam T. Marchant, Jonathan W. Cadwell, Timothy D. Johnston, John Steven Hilborn, Amanda S. Hoffman, Eric Joseph Paulson, Andre Comparini, Peter Panagos, Saul Verbera, Lap Shun Ko, William J. Cash, Alison M. Rooney, Ramon Valls, Meghan E. O'Malley, Aubrey A. Schmidt, Ashley E. Falter, Nathan Andrew Bell, Lynn K. Spokas, Irfan A. Raza, Francine Hoyle, Christian Ryan Daniel Halligan, Rebecca O'Malley, Christen A. Page, Cara Ann Juffer, Eric Van Fredricksen, Hussein Salim Allibhai, Kimberly Danielle Blaise, Bryan Staniszewski, Anthony J. Matulac, Kristina Mendez, Brandon D. Bhagat, Hayley L. Ford, Daniel P. Thor, Catherine E. Kaylor, Thomas A. Chon, Spiro M. Dounis, Chau M. Ta, Daniel Rex, Thaddaeus M. Burgess, Stephen Herzweig, Kristin N. Hoffman, Anthony Sassali, William T. Gutknecht, Jill Leah Stanley, Galib R. Khan, Brennan J. Maloney-Krips, Jeffrey W. Paramore, Christopher J. Calvey, Niles Reid Bergstrom, Peter J. Helf, Jeffrey M. Croft, Brett I. Silverman, Magen M. Reyor, Theophilos S. Constantinou, Sean P. Fischer, Katherine M. Beebe (Pickert), James J. Lenihan III, Yuan Zhang, David C. Carley, Edward H. Levy, Loretta G. Hill, Wendy R. Dalrymple, Robert D. Jones, Kyle Andrew Gasaway, Cara S. Grieco, Matej Kollar, Joseph J. Rother, Warren Chen, Jennifer A. Matous, Marc Ferriello, Robert L. Schlaud, Jr., Caleb E. Hanson, Erica Yamamoto, Pattanan Decharaveeroj, Sara Maggio, Christopher L. Burgess, Denaimou C. N'Garsanet, Lindsey McLaughlin, Shavon Tucker, Christopher Capicotto, Kundan Sandhu, Andrew J. Gallegos, Clifford Hayhurst III, Matthew E. Wren, Edward A. Garcia, Rebecca Mielnik, Christina Spannos (Papscoe), Matthew William Wilpers, Kathleen M. Autry, James R. Kirihara, Jason Dale, Jill Kayleen Colgan, Michinori Kaneko, Kelsey E. Hofacer (Neel), Thomas W. Scott, Matthew John Jefferies, Adam Minsky, Nicholas A. Paonessa, Amir F Aslam, Mathieu Weill, Shawn O. Gillespie, Bryan Van Demark, Erin C. Walls, Vanette E. Torres, Stephanie M. Aldecoa, Lauren E. Inscho, Alison G. Brooks, Thomas Histed, Kristen M. Coulombe, Jeffrey G Pike, Amir Ali, Jenna L. Anderson, Albert Li, Kara A. Paluch (Schroder), Lynnie Hickey-Mehic, Jennifer Mills, David E. Chinoski, Indre Stunzenas, Kayla Marie Futch, Anthony K. Lagat, Stacy McGoldrick, Mikiko Sugaya, Rinky Chopra, Amanda L. Shay, Erika Elko, Ken Ukai, Michelle Okabe, Meng-Lin (Mona) Lu, James K. Russell, Kin Kei Kevin Mok, Natalie M. Marshall, Alla Shutyi, John DeVecchi Jr., Julie Wilson, Dennis M. Delude, Kanuri Bhanu Priya, Eric Hills, Samantha M. Hunt, Ashley Holman, Lauren Schaefer, Young Seoh Lee, Yu Jin Lee, Megan P. Sato, Eric R. Wilson, Muhammad Umar Hamid, Anthony Nusbaum, Adam D. Lake, Guillermo E. Trigo-Mendez, Matthew C. Reighard, Kelly A. Clark, Keely O. Lindstadt, Munehiko Yuzawa, David B. Landrum, Steven P. Duffy, Mallory Brown Hoidal, Miguel A. Marin, Sarah E. Morgan, Flora Kang-Jung Wang, Mary Benson Smith, Dustin F. White, Amira Moris Farag-Beshay, Eric Dickinson, Ryan M. Spurlock, Stacey M. Zafiroff, Krista Suzanne Niebrugge, Stephanie A. Yesnofski, Ryan Ray Olsen Painter, Mathew J. Howard, Amanda Rahner, Charles W. Crawford, Sadie L. Carson, Philip Mezheritsky, Andrew John Leavitt, Travis J. Vogt, Sean McKenna, Brian Walker, Victoria E. Whelan, Lennon Smith, Eric Yu, Melissa Mulick, Steven B. Russell, Amanda Rubeor, Casey J. Hocevar, Katherine L. Thompson, Sarah J. Ross, Lauren Elizabeth Friends, Ashley Brooke Strobel, Lazarus W. Vittas, Erin J. Elliot, Gabriel Kangas, Samuel Robert Young, Katrin D. Salta, Xiaojuan Chen, Brett Stieglitz, Wassim Berro, Alexandra K. Snukal, Drew R. Froehlich, Rayna J. Swanson, Ashley Prosek, Stephanie Eckardt, Marc Jacob Shelton, Kelsea Echo Yu, Hector Estrada, Kyle A. Starr, Mark Edward Martinez, Scott R. Nunez, Andrew Pulitano, Laura Shumake Savarese, Allison C. Hylton, Robert Dustin Cathcart, Joon Hwan Byun, Davin Lee Cottle, Katherine L. Nordman, Steven A. Mich, Patrick C. Ofordire, Eric Nowakowski, Jennifer H. Heist, Alyson L. Reimer, Margo Pacanowski, Jina Han, Susan Chartier (Gomes), Jan-Michael de Vera, Gaelan Boss, Shannon Comrie-Booth, Lauren C. Thornton, Da Wang, Nabin Banskota, Jason Owen, Nestor Urita, Jr., Obianuju Linda-Mary Ekwegbalu, Michael S. Becker, Yanina Reznikov, Daniel A. Bennett, Michael Arcuri, Jeffrey Manning, Andrew J. Zens, Michael H. Lovecraft, Olga V. Ivanova-Mendez, Suihong Wang, Matthew Giammarinaro, Heather Schrader, Lisa Grund, Thomas B. Wilson, Elizabeth Cho, Ashley M. Turner, Leigh Geist, Dong Chen, Julia Abbott, Christopher W. King, Nathan L. Wilbur, Lisa M. Baker, Justin Spike, Dana Marie Gansky, Ross Silverman, Kristen Leigh Provix, Chengcheng Shi, Scott T. Jugan, Renee A. Sapp, Scott Campobenedetto, Michael Spano, Sarah N. Harper, Donna V. De Vera, Regina V. Farrell, Joel Coffey, Jeffrey P. McNerney, Colleen M. Catalano, Kristen Troia, Mary E. Nadjarian, Terrance L. McKnight, Valarie Anne Vaughan, Rachel L. Guild, Ronald F. Beck, Russell James Monson, David A. Johansson, Elizabeth A. Palmeri, Brian D. Stock, Marisa Salerno, Ryan Meals and Scott E. Midla
Intervenor Plaintiff: Michelle Garcia, Szimonetta Petterman, Leticia Facundo and Arlene Ridgeway
Amicus Curiae: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and Washington Legal Foundation
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Shailesh Singh
Case Number: 1:2011cv00377
Filed: January 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2015 Filing 393 SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 87 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 5/29/2015.(nm)
April 21, 2015 Filing 392 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RETRIEVE SEALED MATERIAL: Notice to the attorney of record for the filing party to retrieve sealed document number 87 within thirty (30) days, or the Court will dispose of them. Sealed Records Retrieval due by 5/21/2015. (nm)
October 22, 2014 BILL OF COSTS: hearing that was originally scheduled for Thurs October 9, 2014, that was posponed for 2 weeks has now been cancelled due to the parties having settled the bill of costs, and therefore having withdrawning the Bill of Costs. The Bill of Costs returned to Sidley Austin, LLP, by mail. (dt)
October 8, 2014 BILL OF COSTS: Hearing that was scheduled for Thursday October 9, 2014 at 11:30 a.m. has been adjournded for a 2 week periond at the parties request by e-mail which a copy is attached to the Bill of Costs. The parties will contact the Court if the issue is resolved or in the event that rescheduling is required for the Bill of Costs.. (dt)
September 11, 2014 NOTICE OF TAXATION (Bill of Costs): Received on September 11, 2014 from defendant KPMG's attorney Sidley Austin, LLP, Hearing is scheduled for October 9, 2014 at 11:30 a.m. before the Orders & Judgments Clerk, 500 Pearl Street, Room 200. (dt)
August 20, 2014 Filing 391 Costs Taxed as to #390 USCA Mandate, USCA Case Number 13-0889. in the amount of $252.20. on 08/20/2014 in favor of Appellee KPMG LLP against Appellants Pippins et al.. (nd)
August 12, 2014 Filing 390 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #365 Notice of Appeal filed by Pippins et al. USCA Case Number 13-0889. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 08/12/2014. (nd)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #365 Notice of Appeal filed by Pippins et al; USCA Case Number 13-889. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion by Appellee KPMG LLP to supplement the record on appeal with sealed documents is granted. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 7/22/2013. (nd)
July 3, 2013 Filing 388 DECLARATION of Rachel Bien in Support re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Bien, Rachel)
July 3, 2013 Filing 387 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA. Originally Filed under Seal as ECF No. 87. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
June 25, 2013 Filing 386 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jennifer Altfeld Landau dated 6/24/2013 re: KPMG respectfully requests permission to substitute unredacted, or less redacted versions of the listed documents for the slip sheets or redacted versions that currently appear on ECF. ENDORSEMENT: On the parties submission of the unredacted or less redacted versions of the documents in question, the ECF clerk is directed to substitute them for the redacted versions of the same documents that currently appear on ECF, and to update ECF so that only the unredacted or less redacted versions of the documents in question remain. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/25/2013) (cd)
June 11, 2013 Filing 385 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jennifer Altfeld Landau dated 6/7/2013 re: Request that the Court authorize the ECF clerk to substitute the listed unredacted or less redacted versions of documents for the redacted versions that currently appear on ECF. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/11/2013) (cd)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 384 MEMORANDUM DECISION DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY THE COURT'S ORDER CONCERNING THE COST OF PRESERVING HARD DRIVES PENDING APPEAL: denying #366 Motion, for the reasons set forth in this document. The Clerk of the Court should remove the motion at Docket# 366 from the court's list of active motions. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/16/2013) (cd)
May 10, 2013 Filing 383 DECLARATION of KENNETH C. KOCH in Support re: #366 MOTION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 3, 2012 ORDER TO TRANSFER THE COST OF PRESERVING CERTAIN HARD DRIVES PENDING APPEAL.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Kenney, Colleen)
May 10, 2013 Filing 382 DECLARATION of COLLEEN M. KENNEY in Support re: #366 MOTION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 3, 2012 ORDER TO TRANSFER THE COST OF PRESERVING CERTAIN HARD DRIVES PENDING APPEAL.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kenney, Colleen)
May 10, 2013 Filing 381 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #366 MOTION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 3, 2012 ORDER TO TRANSFER THE COST OF PRESERVING CERTAIN HARD DRIVES PENDING APPEAL.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Kenney, Colleen)
May 8, 2013 Filing 380 MEMO ENDORSED granting #378 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Motion granted. Attorney Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner terminated. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/8/2013) (cd)
May 6, 2013 Filing 379 DECLARATION of Rachel Bien in Support re: #378 MOTION for Elizabeth Wagoner to Withdraw as Attorney.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Bien, Rachel)
May 6, 2013 Filing 378 MOTION for Elizabeth Wagoner to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler.(Swartz, Justin)
April 23, 2013 Filing 377 NOTICE of of Filing of Exhibits Pursuant to April 15, 2013 Court Order re: #373 Stipulation and Order,. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50-1, #51 Exhibit 50-2, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57)(Swartz, Justin)
April 22, 2013 Filing 376 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Opposition re: #366 MOTION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 3, 2012 ORDER TO TRANSFER THE COST OF PRESERVING CERTAIN HARD DRIVES PENDING APPEAL.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Swartz, Justin)
April 22, 2013 Filing 375 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #366 MOTION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 3, 2012 ORDER TO TRANSFER THE COST OF PRESERVING CERTAIN HARD DRIVES PENDING APPEAL.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
April 22, 2013 Filing 374 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (see #375 MEMORANDUM)- REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #366 MOTION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 3, 2012 ORDER TO TRANSFER THE COST OF PRESERVING CERTAIN HARD DRIVES PENDING APPEAL.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin) Modified on 4/23/2013 (db).
April 15, 2013 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #369 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by KPMG LLP, #366 MOTION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 3, 2012 ORDER TO TRANSFER THE COST OF PRESERVING CERTAIN HARD DRIVES PENDING APPEAL filed by KPMG LLP, #368 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by KPMG LLP, #371 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Jamie Schindler, Kyle Pippins, #370 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #366 MOTION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 3, 2012 ORDER TO TRANSFER THE COST OF PRESERVING CERTAIN HARD DRIVES PENDING APPEAL. MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #366 MOTION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 3, 2012 ORDER TO TRANSFER THE COST OF PRESERVING CERTAIN HARD DRIVES PENDING APPEAL filed by Jamie Schindler, Kyle Pippins, #367 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by KPMG LLP, #373 Stipulation and Order, Appeal Fee Payment, #372 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, USCA Case Number 13-889, were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 373 STIPULATION AND ORDER DOCKETING ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS: that the following annexed exhibits should be docketed as part of the District Court record in connection with the Plaintiffs' currently pending appeal, as further set forth in this document. (copy forwarded to the Appeals Clerk) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/15/2013) (cd)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 372 MEMO ENDORSED granting #370 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #366 MOTION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 3, 2012 ORDER TO TRANSFER THE COST OF PRESERVING CERTAIN HARD DRIVES PENDING APPEAL. Responses due by 4/22/2013. Replies due by 5/13/2013. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/28/2013) (cd)
March 26, 2013 Filing 371 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #370 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #366 MOTION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 3, 2012 ORDER TO TRANSFER THE COST OF PRESERVING CERTAIN HARD DRIVES PENDING APPEAL.. MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #366 MOTION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 3, 2012 ORDER TO TRANSFER THE COST OF PRESERVING CERTAIN HARD DRIVES PENDING APPEAL... Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
March 26, 2013 Filing 370 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #366 MOTION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 3, 2012 ORDER TO TRANSFER THE COST OF PRESERVING CERTAIN HARD DRIVES PENDING APPEAL.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler.(Swartz, Justin)
March 20, 2013 Filing 369 DECLARATION of Kenneth C. Koch in Support re: #366 MOTION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 3, 2012 ORDER TO TRANSFER THE COST OF PRESERVING CERTAIN HARD DRIVES PENDING APPEAL.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kenney, Colleen)
March 20, 2013 Filing 368 DECLARATION of Colleen M. Kenney in Support re: #366 MOTION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 3, 2012 ORDER TO TRANSFER THE COST OF PRESERVING CERTAIN HARD DRIVES PENDING APPEAL.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Kenney, Colleen)
March 20, 2013 Filing 367 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #366 MOTION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 3, 2012 ORDER TO TRANSFER THE COST OF PRESERVING CERTAIN HARD DRIVES PENDING APPEAL.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Kenney, Colleen)
March 20, 2013 Filing 366 MOTION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 3, 2012 ORDER TO TRANSFER THE COST OF PRESERVING CERTAIN HARD DRIVES PENDING APPEAL. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(Kenney, Colleen)
March 13, 2013 Appeal Fee Payment: for #365 Notice of Appeal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 0208-8316993. (Swartz, Justin)
March 12, 2013 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #208 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff, filed by Katie L. Thomas (Jackson), Kiera J. Watson, Stephanie C. Snodgrass, Adam T. Marchant, Kevin D. Knipp, Merlyn A. Kushner, Poonam Sakhrani, Marcus A. Flynn, Marissa Mayhorn, Amanda K. Johnson, Terrance L. McKnight, Ronak Brahmbhatt, Jonathan T. McPharlin, Sarah N. Harper, Valerie T. Kaufman, Elizabeth M. Simmons, Anne Male, Michael S. Becker, Justin Spike, Weili Hsu, Sara Maggio, Kelsey E. Hofacer (Neel), Meghan R. Cooper, Matthew C. Reighard, William B. Ross, Irina Brimmell, Paul W. Kemp, Aliesha Nathu, Paulette M. Heur, Saron H. Tegegne, David A. Johansson, Robert D. Jones, Eric R. Wilson, Allison A. Leslie, Kristen L. Muncie, Jeffrey Bland, Kelvin G. Cheng, Elizabeth A. Palmeri, Loretta G. Hill, Adam D. Lake, Adam L. Bockman, Eric Yu, Robert J. Miranda, Kang Li, Maria G. Trujillo, Sean P. Fischer, #40 Order on Motion to Intervene, #334 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by KPMG LLP, #158 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff, filed by Yuk N. Li, Tiffany Chua Chan, Seville Nicole Christmas, Mitchell A. Melfi, Marilyn Louis, Paras H. Dagli, Nicole M. Anderson, Peter Panagos, Orealis Marie Alvarado, Svetlana Condur, Steven Gaul, William Drzich, William Baxter, Michael Yoo, Mary Benson Smith, Scott Lorence Pfister, Sue Yen Chong, Samuel Robert Young, Robert Liu, Rena Zarah, Tyrone Guillory Jr., Yelena Glants, Nimish Patel, Yulia Barland, Michael Weichholz, Melissa Gerdung, Matthew Mills, Mark Nixdorf, Meghan E. O'Malley, Olga Martynov, Valerie Tang, Morgan Ann Frame, Mario Fani, #86 Order, #238 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Daniel Colvin, #102 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by KPMG LLP, #72 Endorsed Letter, #89 Notice of Appearance filed by KPMG LLP, #262 Notice of Appearance filed by KPMG LLP, #169 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff, filed by Niles Reid Bergstrom, Daniel P. Jensen, Daniela Lundin, Kaitlyn Hartwell, Allison C. Hylton, Jill Kayleen Colgan, Kayla Marie Futch, Jin Xing Wang (Xue), Irfan A. Raza, Alison J. Moss, Kayla L. Barrett, Lukasz Kwiatkowski, Joseph Gibson, Jatinder Singh, #100 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by KPMG LLP, #289 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Jamie Schindler, Kyle Pippins, #42 Endorsed Letter, #297 Stipulation and Order, #339 MOTION for Protective Order Sealing Certain Exhibits filed by KPMG LLP, #29 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #23 Order on Motion to Transfer Case filed by KPMG LLP, #33 MOTION to Certify Class and Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA filed by Jamie Schindler, Kyle Pippins, #62 Transcript, #36 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, #191 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff, filed by Samantha Richards, Tie G. Lasater, Scott E. Midla, Sadie L. Carson, Michelle Epstein, Thomas A. Chon, Vincent J. Battaglia, Jr., William E. Cloutet III, Tyler Skelton, Rainy Leforce Spring, Matthew B. Daniels, Joshua D. Smith, Zachary J. Pettinger, Thomas W. Scott, Stacey Gill, Keely O. Lindstadt, Lynnie Hickey-Mehic, Michelle L. Mysuna, Vanita Katrina, Neil M. Morgan, Margo Pacanowski, Kathryn E. Towle, #37 MOTION to Intervene Motion for Leave to Intervene for all Purposes Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a) or, in the alternative, Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b). MOTION to Intervene Motion for Leave to Intervene for all Purposes Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a) or, in the alternative, Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b) filed by Norbert Mendonca, Arlene Ridgeway, Michelle Garcia, Leticia Facundo, Szimonetta Petterman, #279 Endorsed Letter, #311 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by KPMG LLP, #90 MOTION for Protective Order filed by KPMG LLP, #197 Scheduling Order, #245 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff, filed by Cara S. Grieco, James D. McClelland, Jr., Christopher R. Dotson, Eric Yee, Lauren A. Morris, Sharon Brickman, Derek W. Richardson, Jennifer H. Heist, Noelle M. Carlo, #315 MOTION to Strike Document No. #313 Motion to Strike Portions of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Counter-Statement of Material Facts and Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts. MOTION to Strike Document No. #313 Motion to Strike Portions of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Counter-Statement of Material Facts and Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts filed by Jamie Schindler, Kyle Pippins, #240 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff, filed by Kevin M. Olkowski, Erica Barham, Diego A. Bello, Matthew T. Haines, Richard Armstead, Carly N. Kintzing, Amanda B. Kane, Maria Rivera, Stephanie T. Unkart, #227 Consent to Join Class filed by Carmen M. Tellez, Megan E. Toms (Humber), Maria del Mar Hernandez, #110 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by KPMG LLP, #47 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #175 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff, #44 MOTION for Michael C. Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by KPMG LLP, #307 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Jamie Schindler, Kyle Pippins, #196 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff, filed by Gregory T. Montgomery, Jing Tao, Thomas J. Chloe, Evelyn Chan, Brent E. Arnold, Jason R. Walter, Andrew J. Porubcan, Yaelle E. Bernstein, Karen L. Juan, Janice Luo, Su Zheng, Joseph Gentzkow, Jackson Y. Kuo, Lisa M. Morgado, Evan M. Dashe, Chun Y. Zhang, YuQuin Wen Bohannon, John P. Kindelin, Takeo Uchida, #94 MOTION for Eric G. Hoffman, to Withdraw as Attorney filed by KPMG LLP, #48 MOTION for Steven T. Catlett to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by KPMG LLP, #32 MOTION to Intervene Motion for Leave to Intervene for all Purposes Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a) or, in the alternative, Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b). MOTION to Intervene Motion for Leave to Intervene for all Purposes Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a) or, in the alternative, Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b) filed by Norbert Mendonca, Arlene Ridgeway, Michelle Garcia, Leticia Facundo, Szimonetta Petterman, #229 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff, filed by Elizabeth Reisman, Xiu T. Khaw, Clayton J. Huffman, David D. Thomas, Sakina Khan, Ryan J. Keys, Aaron D. Goodman, #287 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Jamie Schindler, Kyle Pippins, #56 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #45 MOTION for Jennifer Altfield Landau to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by KPMG LLP, #60 MOTION for Wesley D. Felix to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by KPMG LLP, #15 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by KPMG LLP, #277 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #234 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff, filed by Ryan Meals, James K. Russell, Yuliana Ruff, Ronald Karroll, Jr., Jason Sattar, Jonathan D. Leins, Matthew A. LaPointe, Noah Sullum, Jacob R. Linville, David P. Grimner, #148 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Mona Aflatooni, #105 Notice of Appearance filed by Jamie Schindler, Kyle Pippins, #146 Endorsed Letter, #221 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff, filed by Michelle Okabe, Stephen Van Lyon, Rebecca A. Krammen, Krystle Tolentino, Kenneth Ty, T'Lane B. Briggeman, Nicholas A. Paonessa, Tracie Togami, Robert Karr, Keenan James McCullough, Thomas Dufresne, Thosana Tan, Monica L. Long, Trevor D. McKendrick, Kristen Chong, Kelly Meriano, Nicole C. Doran, Shahan Ahmed, Sean M. Paul, Moony C. Tong, Megumi Komiya Nakamura, Ronald F. Beck, Katrinaca E. Ware, Steven Murphey, Shuang Lu, Sarah Vanlandingham, Thomas P. Keegan, Rayna J. Swanson, Neil Shah, Kunal Dudheker, Victoria E. Whelan, Teresa Carranza, Shane Huiberts, Sergey Tkachev, #54 Endorsed Letter, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #324 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Jamie Schindler, Kyle Pippins, #248 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff, filed by Karen Meyers, Jessica H. Schatz, Marina Kalan, Philip Twede, Albert Li, Andrew John Leavitt, Flora Kang-Jung Wang, Lily Situ, Bethany N. Adams, Hua-Jung Yu, Sarah L. Luna, Jennifer Rios, Shawn O. Gillespie, Zhen Su, Heidi Smilde, Jeffrey P. McNerney, Charles Conrad Boettger, #155 Notice of Filing Transcript, #244 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Olga V. Ivanova-Mendez, Ignatius Jackson, Kyle L. Fletcher, Sean McKenna, #314 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by KPMG LLP, #20 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jamie Schindler, Kyle Pippins, #285 MOTION to Comply Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36(a)(6) Regarding the Sufficiency of Defendant's Answers to Certain Requests for Admission filed by Jamie Schindler, Kyle Pippins, #49 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #351 Endorsed Letter, #215 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Lauren Lippincott Darsey, #160 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff, filed by Andrew Rehm, Daniel Andrews, Daega Fatah, Anne M Martin, Evan R Parzych, Emilio Jorge Sartori, Chava S. Schwartz, Christopher A Marino, Clifford Hayhurst III, Harrison D Cole, Christopher Blake Elliot, Brian Edward Capstick, Brian Edward Stamile, Heather Schrader, Heather Jean Reeves Prudhomme, Christopher Adam Wade, Corey Jones, Michael Ian Tarrant, Evan M Zawatsky, #161 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff, filed by Joanna Canaras, Suihong Wang, Shannon Cunniffe, Shirley Jean Criddle, James W. Lee III, Wieslawa Jamroz, Joseph Walter Vazzano, Luke Cletus Iverson, Sarah Jane Medrano, Laura Ann Westenberg, Matthew Kunz, Zahra J. Castillo, Robert A. Miller, William S. Tierno, Michael Santolucito, Jillian Bernard, Peter John Puglisi III, Michael Chiulli, Juliet Lee Smith, Joe Manuel Guerrero, Ryan B. Markowitz, Kanuri Bhanu Priya, Kristen Leigh Provix, Jennifer M. Grayson, Laura Shumake Savarese, Matthew Giammarinaro, Matthew B. Smith, Jeffrey Manning, #57 MOTION for Michael D. Warden to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by KPMG LLP, #202 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff, filed by Arpan Patel, Bobbie Jo Emond, Alana Perini, Brian J. Cogley, Jessica R. Conway, Megan L. Opsahl, Stephen Boscola, David S. Guy, Charles Baumann, Ashley E. Falter, David B. Reiter, Myra S. Aslam, Tanya R. Mazakian, Alison G. Brooks, Lauren Plumley, Gordon E. Walters, Matthew Skellan, Peter W. Wong, Timothy DeLuca, Rachel A. Stuart, Jeffrey W. Paramore, Ross Silverman, Ryan D. Carr, Jordan Samet, Steven B. Russell, Julian Paik, Kevin W. Young, #1 Complaint filed by Jamie Schindler, Kyle Pippins, #249 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff, filed by Daniel Had
March 12, 2013 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #365 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
March 12, 2013 Appeal Fee Due: for #365 Notice of Appeal. Appeal fee due by 3/26/2013. (tp)
March 11, 2013 Filing 365 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #345 Order on Motion for Discovery, #363 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b),, Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), #364 Clerk's Judgment,, #349 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Seal, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion to Strike,,, Order on Motion to Certify Class,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Julia Abbott, Maya Abdulkarim, Reuben Abitbol, Marc C. Abraham, Johnny Acosta, Bethany N. Adams, Francis Adams, Stephanie M. Adams, Ashley A. Adeogba, Atul Prasad Adhikary, John C. Adrian, Mona Aflatooni, Tania Rhanda Ahmad, Shahan Ahmed, Amber M. Ahsmann (Golden), Stephanie M. Aldecoa, Sreya S. Alex (Samuel), Kyle L. Alexander, Amir Ali, David W. Allen, Kerri J. Allen, Yoana Allen, Hussein Salim Allibhai, Ailda Alushi, Orealis Marie Alvarado, Samantha Anderegg-Botichi, Benjamin B. Anderson, Jenna L. Anderson, Nicole M. Anderson, Nicole Elizabeth Anderson, Daniel Andrews, Artsiom Anisko, Michael Arcuri, Kimberly Argy, Richard Armstead, Brent E. Arnold, Jennifer L. Arthur, Brian Ascencio, Adesuwa Asemota, Amir F Aslam, Myra S. Aslam, Ashley Albers Austin, Amanda Authement, Kathleen M. Autry, Nina J. Aves, Adam G. Avni, Margaret L. Aycock, Katherine L. Aye, Jennifer Bai, Jason T. Bailey, Selena R. Bailey, Kyle Baker, Lisa M. Baker, Kelcie Kiku Balaeff, Brooke A. Ballance, Nabin Banskota, Juan P. Barajas, Dominica Barber, Erica Barham, Jeffrey W. Barlam, Yulia Barland, Kayla L. Barrett, Hermine Barseghian, Karishma Barua, Ari Michael Baruch, Del Ciela Basilio, Vincent J. Battaglia, Jr., Jennifer K. Bauman, Charles Baumann, David B. Bawel, William Baxter, Ronald F. Beck, Jessica R. Beckendorf, Michael S. Becker, Justin N. Beebe, Katherine M. Beebe (Pickert), Kevin Bekas, Nathan Andrew Bell, Diego A. Bello, Daniel A. Bennett, Kerry Ann Berg, Leif E. Bergquist, Niles Reid Bergstrom, Jillian Bernard, Yaelle E. Bernstein, Wassim Berro, Nathan Edward Bertsch, Kara N. Bevis, Brandon D. Bhagat, Aubrey Marie Bickmore Neeley, Joshua D. Bicknell, Drew M. Biddle, Ashley Billinger, Jonathan Bingham, Sisai A. Birhanu, Matthew Birmingham, Briana G. Bishop, Kimberly Danielle Blaise, Heather K. Blake, Jeffrey Bland, Lisa A. Bland (Horton), Kerry L. Blatt, Christine L. Blaylock, Kerri Blum, Justin B. Bobus, Adam L. Bockman, Sarah N. Bocks, Emily Boeckmann, Charles Conrad Boettger, YuQuin Wen Bohannon, Paula A. Boone, Emily R. Boriack, Heather L. Boring, Stephen Boscola, Gaelan Boss, Ronak Brahmbhatt, Colleen Brennan, Felicia Brenner, Sharon Brickman, T'Lane B. Briggeman, Irina Brimmell, Mathew Brinsden, Emilie J. Britt, Ashley Brooke Strobel, Alison G. Brooks, Kristina M. Bross, Anna E. Broudy, Mark Preston Brough, Amy H. Brousse, Elizabeth D. Brown, Joelle M. Brown, Kyle V. Brown, Lauren M. Brown, Melissa L. Brown, Trent C. Brown, Melissa Brownfield (Luiso), Ross Bruening, Alisha Brumbaugh, Eve Buckwalter, Jamie Buenzow, James A. Bumbulsky, Kristen Burbank, Christopher L. Burgess, Thaddaeus M. Burgess, Brandon Burkley, Vanessa Burns, Julia Bushe, Christopher D. Bushey, Jessica Marie Bushey, Heather Buss, John M. Butler, Joon Hwan Byun, Christopher Cacanindin, Jonathan W. Cadwell, Danielle L. Cahill, Steven Calder, Sarah E. Callan Stanclift, Christopher J. Calvey, Scott Campobenedetto, Joanna Canaras, Christopher Capicotto, Lauren Danielle Caplan, Brian Edward Capstick, David C. Carley, Noelle M. Carlo, Nathan E. Carlton, Cairo J. Carr, Ryan D. Carr, Teresa Carranza, Sadie L. Carson, William J. Cash, Vanessa Angelin Castano, Zahra J. Castillo, Colleen M. Catalano, Robert Dustin Cathcart, Garrett Dee Cazier, Kyle Joseph Chagnon, Evelyn Chan, Patrick Chan, Tiffany Chua Chan, Winnie Chan, Kingman Chan, Jr., Elizabeth Lea Chandler, Stacia Charland, Susan Chartier (Gomes), Myla N. Chatman, Allison Chen, Daniel Chen, Dong Chen, Jiesi Chen, Laurie Chen, Rongchen Chen, Warren Chen, Xiaojuan Chen, Kelvin G. Cheng, Yim Chi Cheng, Aaron Cheung-Kwong Chan, Diana Chia, Christopher M. Chiaraluce, Christine Chiaramonte, Sho Chinen, David E. Chinoski, Michael Chiulli, Thomas J. Chloe, Elizabeth Cho, Sumi Choi, Urim Choi, Andrew J. Choly, Thomas A. Chon, Kristen Chong, Sue Yen Chong, Rinky Chopra, Alexandra D. Chou, Sophia Chowdhury, Logan J. Christianson, Ryan L. Christie, Seville Nicole Christmas, Cant Charles Christopher, Adam Chrudimsky, Robert S. Chun, Enoch Chung, Jae Y. Chung, Caitlin C. Clark, Kelly A. Clark, Matthew M. Clayton, William E. Cloutet III, Joel Coffey, Jenna N. Cofman, Brian J. Cogley, Emma Colacicco, Adam D. Colba, Harrison D Cole, Jill Kayleen Colgan, Christopher John Howe Collato, Chelsea Neale Collins, Daniel Colvin, Jesus Comendeiro, Andre Comparini, Shannon Comrie-Booth, Svetlana Condur, Kimberly C. Conner, Theophilos S. Constantinou, Stephanie R. Conti, Jessica R. Conway, Alex Cook, Justin B. Cook, Alanna Cooper, Meghan R. Cooper, Zachariah Cooper, Michael D. Coriell, Davin Lee Cottle, Kristen M. Coulombe, Aren J. Cowan, Frederick James Cowan Jr., Andrew T. Cox, Katie Cox (Westgard), Charles W. Crawford, Shirley Jean Criddle, Michael Crnkovich, Henry Ymas Crockerham Jr., Jeffrey M. Croft, Jennifer L. Crowe, Shannon Cunniffe, Elizabeth H. Cunningham, David Curtis, Natalie C. Cusat, Zachary J. Cyman, Michael D. DAntonio, Janice Daclan, Paras H. Dagli, Joshua Timothy Dahmen, Jason Dale, Wendy R. Dalrymple, Parissa Hannah Daneshmand, Matthew B. Daniels, Ashley A. Darden, Lauren Lippincott Darsey, Evan M. Dashe, Jeromy R. Davenport, Laura Davidson, Bryan Davis, Leslie Ellen Davis, Michael Dean Davis, Nicole Davis, Kristie Davis Zapf, Janine Joyce De Jesus, Donna V. De Vera, Jonathan DeBeaumont, Mark A. DeBonee, Christine DeBonee (Labrie), Mark J. DeLuca, Timothy DeLuca, Jacqueline Marie DeMeo, John DeVecchi Jr., Lisa M. Deane, Joseph Decardi-Nelson, Pattanan Decharaveeroj, Cristina Marie Del Buono, Dennis M. Delude, Edward Demone, John Deng, Michael W. Derington, Michael Deter, Jessica Deyo, Paul James DiCarlo, Edward Diasio, Alexander L Diaz, Andrea Diaz, Eric Dickinson, Erin Diffley, Ashley Peyton Disinger, Jenni L. Dollahon, Adele M. Domingue, Erin Elizabeth Donia, Holly C. Donley, Connor Donnelly, Nicole C. Doran, James A. Dorey, April L. Doten, Christopher R. Dotson, Spiro M. Dounis, Brian Ross Dout, William Drzich, Kunal Dudheker, Steven P. Duffy, Thomas Dufresne, Jeremy P. Dugan, James R. Duncan III, Madison R. Duvall, Ashley Rosanne Dwyer, Nicholas A. Ebersole, Stephanie Eckardt, Nathaniel Edelman, Keri A. Ehrlich, Obianuju Linda-Mary Ekwegbalu, Manal Elhag, Faical Elhajjam, Erika Elko, Christopher Blake Elliot, Erin J. Elliot, Kevin Ellis, Bobbie Jo Emond, Mai Endo, Stephen F. Endres, Kristina Eng, Rachel M. English, Michelle Epstein, Megan Erwin, Max H. Essoh, John G. Estelle, Hector Estrada, Erin M. Everly, Dominika Ewa Pabon, Arley R. Ewald, Ashley E. Falter, Mario Fani, Amira Moris Farag-Beshay, Josef H. Farbstein, Regina V. Farrell, Daega Fatah, Diana Fazylova, Nathan Fedders, Michael J. Fedun, Brittany L. Fedun (Figliolino), David Edward Feldman, Bond N. Ferguson (Munson), Christopher M. Ferrell, Marc Ferriello, Seth T. Fick, Vincente Figueroa, Marc Ryan Fillari, Jared Brice Filus, William L. Fine, Tia Alisha Finn, Sean P. Fischer, Kyle L. Fletcher, Sara R. Floreani, Marcus A. Flynn, Hayley L. Ford, James W. Forsythe, Tammie Fossaceca, Jeremy T Fowler, Lillian N. Fraguada Vializ, Lisa B. Fraley, Morgan Ann Frame, Joseph F. Franzone, Eric Van Fredricksen, Zhanna A. Freeman, Edward Freiwald, David Freund, Lauren Elizabeth Friends, Drew R. Froehlich, Patrick Michael Funk, Christopher Furlong, Tomoko Furukawa, Kayla Marie Futch, Matthew C. Gadzinski, Andrew J. Gallegos, Dana Marie Gansky, Petruta L. Gantoi, Patrick J. Garbani, Edward A. Garcia, Chase Michael Gardner, Kyle Andrew Gasaway, Steven Gaul, BeiLai Ge, Leigh Geist, Brandon Gemoll, Krysten M. Genaway, Joseph Gentzkow, Brandon Russell George, Melissa Gerdung, Dylan C. Gfeller, Matthew Giammarinaro, Christine Ann Gibson, Joseph Gibson, Alexander J. Gilbertson, Megan R. Gilbertson, Stacey Gill, Allison Peltier Gillam, Ethan J. Giller, Shawn O. Gillespie, Sarah Giltner, Yelena Glants, Kristopher Glaser, Lacy R. Glaser, John Edward Glockzen, Jr., Michael D. Gogolen, Lauren Goldfarb, Bryan Goldfinger, Gregory Goldsand, Benjamin D. Goode, Erica A. Goode, Aaron D. Goodman, Karen E. Gorzynski, Santo S. Gramando III, Jennifer M. Grayson, Cara S. Grieco, Abby Griesedieck (Reeves), Matthew R. Griffin, David P. Grimner, Bonni Grossman, Lisa Grund, Virginia Grzenia, Laura Guarraci, Joe Manuel Guerrero, Rachel L. Guild, Tyrone Guillory Jr., Shelley Gulati, Anna C. Gullickson, Grace T. Gutberlet, Ashley S. Guthmann, William T. Gutknecht, David S. Guy, David Ha, Matthew T. Haines, Dawson Hale, Heather L. Hall, Jennifer C. Hall, Christian Ryan Daniel Halligan, Muhammad Umar Hamid, John R. Hamill III, Tameka L. Hammond, Jina Han, Jordan A. Handsaker, Mathew S. Hanley, Kevin Joseph Hannan, Caleb E. Hanson, Andrew Hardy, Benjamin D Harmon, Sarah N. Harper, Ebony Harris, John P. Harris, Michael Addison Harris, Michelle D. Harris, Rondal Harris, Jr., Kristina M. Harrison, Erin Elizabeth Hart, Kaitlyn Hartwell, Shawn L. Hatfield, Sean Paul Hathorn, Clifford Hayhurst III, John Hays, Jennifer H. Heist, Peter J. Helf, Rennie Henry, Andrea Henry (Speck), Maria del Mar Hernandez, Emily Barzee Herrick, Amy Hertz, Stephen Herzweig, Phillip M. Heu-Weller, Paulette M. Heur, Lynnie Hickey-Mehic, Zeb F. High, Jr., John Steven Hilborn, Loretta G. Hill, Amy A. Hillenbrand, Eric Hills, Jaime Hinojosa, Keiko Hirakawa, Thomas Histed, Casey J. Hocevar, Kelsey E. Hofacer (Neel), Amanda S. Hoffman, Kristin N. Hoffman, Mallory Brown Hoidal, Ashley Holman, Heidi Lynn Holmes, Ryan Farrell Holmes, Tamara R. Hook, Brittany K. Hopp, Connie Horng, Rachel Houdek, Mathew J. Howard, Jennifer L. Howell, Francine Hoyle, Weili Hsu, Connie M. Hu, Elisa Lee Hua Wu, Anna Huang, Jing Huang, Geffery Hubble, Daniel Huey, Clayton J. Huffman, Shane Huiberts, Jason Huisman, Samantha M. Hunt, Allison C. Hylton, Lauren E. Inscho, Jennifer M. Interlandi, Olga V. Ivanova-Mendez, Luke Cletus Iverson, Sumiah A. Ja
February 15, 2013 Filing 364 CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Decision dated November 29, 2012 and Order dated February 7, 2013, the motion for reconsideration is denied, and the motion for entry of partial final judgment is denied as moot; Defendant's motion for Summary Judgment is granted; Plaintiffs' FLSA claims are dismissed with prejudice, and Plaintiff's state law claims are dismissed without prejudice; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 2/15/13) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(ml)
February 7, 2013 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: #363 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (ama)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER REINSTATING FINAL JUDGMENT on denying #354 Motion to Alter Judgment ; finding as moot #357 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). The motion for reconsideration (Docket No. 354) is denied, and the motion for entry of partial final judgment (Docket No. 357) is denied as moot. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the file.(Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/07/2013) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ama)
January 25, 2013 Filing 362 RESPONSE to Motion re: #357 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b).. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer)
January 18, 2013 Filing 361 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #354 MOTION to Alter Judgment Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) Or In The Alternative For Reconsideration Under Local Rule 6.3.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
January 11, 2013 Filing 360 DECLARATION of Jonathan B. Wyatt in Response to the Court's December 21 Order Concerning Discovery, and in Opposition re: #354 MOTION to Alter Judgment Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) Or In The Alternative For Reconsideration Under Local Rule 6.3.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Partially Redacted), #2 Exhibit B)(Landau, Jennifer)
January 11, 2013 Filing 359 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #354 MOTION to Alter Judgment Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) Or In The Alternative For Reconsideration Under Local Rule 6.3. Response to the Court's December 21 Order Concerning Discovery. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer)
January 11, 2013 Filing 358 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #357 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b).. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
January 11, 2013 Filing 357 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler.(Swartz, Justin)
December 28, 2012 Filing 356 DECLARATION of Shirley So in Support re: #354 MOTION to Alter Judgment Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) Or In The Alternative For Reconsideration Under Local Rule 6.3.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins. (Swartz, Justin)
December 28, 2012 Filing 355 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #354 MOTION to Alter Judgment Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) Or In The Alternative For Reconsideration Under Local Rule 6.3.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins. (Swartz, Justin)
December 28, 2012 Filing 354 MOTION to Alter Judgment Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) Or In The Alternative For Reconsideration Under Local Rule 6.3. Document filed by Kyle Pippins.(Swartz, Justin)
December 21, 2012 Filing 353 RESPONSE TO LETTERS FROM COUNSEL: As I said, the ball is in plaintiff's court. On the day plaintiffs make a timely motion pursuant to Rule 59(e), the judgment will be automatically vacated. If the time for making such a motion passes, I will consider the issues raised in plaintiffs' letter waived. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/21/2012) BY ECF TO ALL COUNSEL. (mt)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 352 SCHEDULING ORDER: Last, if you can find cases that address who should bear these costs during the period when an appeal is pending - after someone has won the case - I would appreciate it. Those cases would be far more relevant to a decision on the motion that would cases that deal with cost-shifting during the pre-trial period. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/18/2012) Copies by ECF Sent By Chambers. (ama)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jennifer Altfeld Landau dated 12/11/2012 re: Counsel for Defendant respectfully requests Your Honor to transfer the costs of hard drive preservation to Plaintiffs pending any appeal and to refer to Magistrate Judge Cott the question of how much in costs should be shifted and whether some of the prospective costs can be reduced. ENDORSEMENT: I will however, entertain an order to transfer the cost. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/11/2012) (pl)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Justin M. Swartz dated 12/10/2012 re: Request for a conference. ENDORSEMENT: There is no need for a conference. I am not modifying my prior order. Until the appeal is decided, KPMG maintain the information. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/11/2012) (cd)
November 30, 2012 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: #349 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Seal, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Certify Class, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (ama)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 349 DECISION GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS' FLSA CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE, DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS' STATE LAW CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE: ORDER finding as moot #264 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #270 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot #280 Motion to Seal; finding as moot #302 Motion for Protective Order. ; finding as moot #306 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot #315 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot #320 Motion for Protective Order. ; finding as moot #325 Motion to Certify Class; finding as moot #330 Motion for Protective Order. ; finding as moot #339 Motion for Protective Order.. KPMG'S motion for summary judgment dismissing this case is Granted. All other pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment for defendant dismissing this action and to close the file. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/29/2012) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ama)
October 18, 2012 Filing 348 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Samantha Anderegg-Botichi, Tia Alisha Finn, Michael Addison Harris, Kei Kuramoto, Hui Shan See. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 347 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING LATE OPT INS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel for Plaintiffs and KPMG, that: 1. Consents to join for the Late Opt-Ins may be filed in this matter subject to the following: a. The issue of whether the tolling of the statute of limitations ordered by the Court on April 15, 2011 will apply to these claims will be deferred for later resolution- either by agreement of the Parties or motion practice (if necessary) after the Court's resolution of the Parties' pending motions for summary judgment. b. The Late Opt-Ins will be deemed to have asserted claims as of the date that their consents to join are filed, such that they will be no worse off vis a vis the limitations period than if they filed an independent action on the same date. 2. The provisions of the [Proposed] Stipulation Regarding La~e Opt-Ins will be applicable to any individual that has tiled a late consent to join this matter as a Party Plaintiff on or before October 23, 2012. No additional late consents to join will be PERMITTED after this date absent agreement of the parties and the Court's permission (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/18/2012) (js)
October 10, 2012 Filing 346 MEMO ENDORSEMENT ON NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION REGARDING THE SUFFICIENCY OF DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO CERTAIN REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS: denying #285 Motion to Comply. ENDORSEMENT: Motion Denied. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/10/2012) (djc)
October 10, 2012 Filing 345 MEMO ENDORSEMENT ON NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DISCOVERY IN THE ALTERNATIVE UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 56(d): denying #288 Motion for Discovery. ENDORSEMENT: Denied, without prejudice. There will be plenty of opportunity for discovery if the summary judgment motions are inconclusive.(Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/10/2012) (djc)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Justin M. Swartz dated 9/7/2012 re: We write in response to the Court's question in its letter endorsement of yesterday - whether there is opposition to KPMG's pending protective order motions. ENDORSEMENT: Conference case. Meanwhile KPMG should file motion papers under seal so I can get started on them. But that should not be interpreted as a finding that confidentiality is appropriate. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/10/2012) (lmb)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from J. Landau, Sidley Austin dated 9/4/2012 re: Courtesy copies of KPMG's motion for a protective order. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel: Is there opposition to either of KPMG's pending protective order motions? (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/6/2012) (cd) Modified on 9/10/2012 (cd).
September 6, 2012 Filing 342 NOTICE of Revocation of Consent to Join. Document filed by Brian Ascencio, Leslie L Perrine, Michael Welton, Rena Zarah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
September 4, 2012 Filing 341 DECLARATION of Jennifer Altfeld Landau in Support re: #339 MOTION for Protective Order Sealing Certain Exhibits.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Landau, Jennifer)
September 4, 2012 Filing 340 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #339 MOTION for Protective Order Sealing Certain Exhibits.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer)
September 4, 2012 Filing 339 MOTION for Protective Order Sealing Certain Exhibits. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(Landau, Jennifer)
August 30, 2012 Filing 338 DECLARATION of Rachel Bien in Support re: #325 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DD, #2 Exhibit EE, #3 Exhibit FF, #4 Exhibit GG, #5 Exhibit HH, #6 Exhibit II, #7 Exhibit JJ, #8 Exhibit KK)(Bien, Rachel)
August 30, 2012 Filing 337 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #325 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
August 23, 2012 Filing 336 DECLARATION of Eileen M. Walsh in Opposition re: #325 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B (Redacted))(Landau, Jennifer)
August 23, 2012 Filing 335 DECLARATION of Colleen M. Kenney in Opposition re: #325 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Landau, Jennifer)
August 23, 2012 Filing 334 DECLARATION of Jennifer Altfeld Landau in Opposition re: #325 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Landau, Jennifer)
August 23, 2012 Filing 333 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #325 MOTION to Certify Class. and Appointment of Class Counsel. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer)
August 22, 2012 Filing 332 DECLARATION of Jennifer Altfeld Landau in Support re: #330 MOTION for Protective Order Sealing Certain Pleadings, Testimony and Exhibits.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Landau, Jennifer)
August 22, 2012 Filing 331 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #330 MOTION for Protective Order Sealing Certain Pleadings, Testimony and Exhibits.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer)
August 22, 2012 Filing 330 MOTION for Protective Order Sealing Certain Pleadings, Testimony and Exhibits. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(Landau, Jennifer)
August 16, 2012 Filing 329 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Colleen M. Kenney dated 8/13/12 re: Counsel writes to request that the Court defer the briefing on the class certification motion until after it has ruled on the parties' pending motions for summary judgment. ENDORSEMENT: The briefing schedule stays as it is. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/15/2012) (mro) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2012: #1 Letter) (mde).
August 13, 2012 Filing 328 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #320 MOTION for Protective Order Sealing Certain Pleadings, Testimony and Exhibits.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer)
August 9, 2012 Filing 327 DECLARATION of Rachel Bien in Support re: #325 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC)(Bien, Rachel) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/1/2013) (sdi).
August 9, 2012 Filing 326 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #325 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
August 9, 2012 Filing 325 MOTION to Certify Class. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler.(Swartz, Justin)
August 3, 2012 Filing 324 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #306 MOTION to Strike Document No. #292 Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' 56.1 Statement., #315 MOTION to Strike Document No. #313 Motion to Strike Portions of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Counter-Statement of Material Facts and Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts. MOTION to Strike Document No. #313 Motion to Strike Portions of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Counter-Statement of Material Facts and Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
August 2, 2012 Filing 323 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #302 MOTION for Protective Order SEALING CERTAIN PLEADINGS, TESTIMONY AND EXHIBITS.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer)
July 27, 2012 Filing 322 DECLARATION of Jennifer Altfeld Landau in Support re: #320 MOTION for Protective Order Sealing Certain Pleadings, Testimony and Exhibits.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Landau, Jennifer)
July 27, 2012 Filing 321 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #320 MOTION for Protective Order Sealing Certain Pleadings, Testimony and Exhibits.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer)
July 27, 2012 Filing 320 MOTION for Protective Order Sealing Certain Pleadings, Testimony and Exhibits. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(Landau, Jennifer)
July 27, 2012 Filing 319 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #306 MOTION to Strike Document No. #292 Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' 56.1 Statement., #315 MOTION to Strike Document No. #313 Motion to Strike Portions of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Counter-Statement of Material Facts and Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts. MOTION to Strike Document No. #313 Motion to Strike Portions of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Counter-Statement of Material Facts and Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer)
July 20, 2012 Filing 318 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #288 MOTION for Discovery IN THE ALTERNATIVE UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 56(d).. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
July 20, 2012 Filing 317 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #285 MOTION to Comply Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36(a)(6) Regarding the Sufficiency of Defendant's Answers to Certain Requests for Admission.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
July 19, 2012 Filing 316 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #315 MOTION to Strike Document No. #313 Motion to Strike Portions of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Counter-Statement of Material Facts and Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts. MOTION to Strike Document No. #313 Motion to Strike Portions of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Counter-Statement of Material Facts and Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
July 19, 2012 Filing 315 MOTION to Strike Document No. #313 Motion to Strike Portions of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Counter-Statement of Material Facts and Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler.(Swartz, Justin)
July 13, 2012 Filing 314 DECLARATION of Jennifer Altfeld Landau in Support re: #264 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W)(Landau, Jennifer) (Attachment 20 replaced on 6/26/2013) (sdi).
July 13, 2012 Filing 313 REPLY re: #300 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1 and Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts, Filed in Support of KPMG LLP's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer) (Main Document 313 replaced on 6/26/2013) (sdi).
July 13, 2012 Filing 312 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #264 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer)
July 13, 2012 Filing 311 DECLARATION of COLLEEN M. KENNEY in Opposition re: #288 MOTION for Discovery IN THE ALTERNATIVE UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 56(d).. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Landau, Jennifer)
July 13, 2012 Filing 310 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #288 MOTION for Discovery IN THE ALTERNATIVE UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 56(d).. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer)
July 13, 2012 Filing 309 DECLARATION of JENNIFER ALTFELD LANDAU in Opposition re: #285 MOTION to Comply Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36(a)(6) Regarding the Sufficiency of Defendant's Answers to Certain Requests for Admission.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Landau, Jennifer)
July 13, 2012 Filing 308 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #285 MOTION to Comply Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36(a)(6) Regarding the Sufficiency of Defendant's Answers to Certain Requests for Admission.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer)
July 13, 2012 Filing 307 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #306 MOTION to Strike Document No. #292 Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' 56.1 Statement.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
July 13, 2012 Filing 306 MOTION to Strike Document No. #292 Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler.(Swartz, Justin)
July 13, 2012 Filing 305 DECLARATION of JENNIFER ALTFELD LANDAU in Support re: #302 MOTION for Protective Order SEALING CERTAIN PLEADINGS, TESTIMONY AND EXHIBITS.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Landau, Jennifer)
July 13, 2012 Filing 304 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #302 MOTION for Protective Order SEALING CERTAIN PLEADINGS, TESTIMONY AND EXHIBITS.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer)
July 13, 2012 Filing 303 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #270 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
July 13, 2012 Filing 302 MOTION for Protective Order SEALING CERTAIN PLEADINGS, TESTIMONY AND EXHIBITS. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(Landau, Jennifer)
July 12, 2012 Filing 301 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #280 MOTION to Seal Certain Pleadings, Testimony and Exhibits and for Protective Order.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer)
July 10, 2012 Filing 300 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #266 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin) (Main Document 300 replaced on 7/1/2013) (sdi). (Main Document 300 replaced on 7/1/2013) (sdi).
July 9, 2012 Filing 299 CONSENT TO JOIN CLASS. Document filed by Melissa Brownfield (Luiso), Jamelle A. Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 298 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING LATE OPT-INS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel for Plaintiffs and KPMG, that: 1. Consents to join for the Late Opt-Ins may be filed in this matter subject to the following: a. The issue of whether the tolling of the statute of limitations ordered by the Court on April 15, 2011 will apply to these claims will be deferred for later resolution-either by agreement of the Parties or motion practice (if necessary) after the Court's resolution of the Parties' pending motions for summary judgment; b. the Late Opt-Ins will be deemed to have asserted claims as of the date that their consents to join are filed, such that they will be no worse off vis a vis the limitations period other than if they filed an independent action on the same date. 2. The provisions of the Stipulation Regarding Late Opt-Ins will be applicable to any individual that has filed a late consent to join this matter as a Party Plaintiff on or before July 6, 2012. No additional late consents to join will be permitted after this date absent agreement of the parties and the Court's permission. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/9/2012) (mro)
July 3, 2012 Filing 297 STIPULATION REGARDING CERTAIN DISCOVERY MATTERS: Plaintiffs and KPMG stipulate to guidelines governing discovery. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/3/2012) (jar)
June 29, 2012 Filing 296 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #264 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
June 29, 2012 Filing 295 DECLARATION of Rachel Bien in Opposition re: #264 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit KKK, #2 Exhibit LLL, #3 Exhibit MMM, #4 Exhibit NNN, #5 Exhibit OOO, #6 Exhibit PPP, #7 Exhibit QQQ)(Bien, Rachel)
June 29, 2012 Filing 294 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #300) - COUNTER STATEMENT TO #266 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin) Modified on 7/12/2012 (ldi).
June 29, 2012 Filing 293 DECLARATION of Jennifer Altfeld Landau in Opposition re: #270 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W)(Landau, Jennifer) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/26/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/26/2013) (sdi).
June 29, 2012 Filing 292 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #271 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer) (Main Document 292 replaced on 6/26/2013) (sdi).
June 29, 2012 Filing 291 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #270 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer)
June 29, 2012 Filing 290 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Support re: #288 MOTION for Discovery IN THE ALTERNATIVE UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 56(d).. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E (Part 1 of 2), #6 Exhibit E (Part 2 of 2), #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Swartz, Justin)
June 29, 2012 Filing 289 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #288 MOTION for Discovery IN THE ALTERNATIVE UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 56(d).. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
June 29, 2012 Filing 288 MOTION for Discovery IN THE ALTERNATIVE UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 56(d). Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler.(Swartz, Justin)
June 29, 2012 Filing 287 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Wagoner in Support re: #285 MOTION to Comply Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36(a)(6) Regarding the Sufficiency of Defendant's Answers to Certain Requests for Admission.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 2), #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
June 29, 2012 Filing 286 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #285 MOTION to Comply Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36(a)(6) Regarding the Sufficiency of Defendant's Answers to Certain Requests for Admission.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
June 29, 2012 Filing 285 MOTION to Comply Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36(a)(6) Regarding the Sufficiency of Defendant's Answers to Certain Requests for Admission. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler.(Swartz, Justin)
June 29, 2012 Filing 284 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Jennifer Bai, Kyle Baker, Felicia Brenner, Christopher Cacanindin, Patrick Chan, Edward Freiwald, Bryan Goldfinger, Stephen Herzweig, Ashley Johnson, Leslie Jordan, Andrew Katz, Lauryn King, Jeffrey Koslow, Thu Lam, Li Liu, Heather Moreland, Keturah Moss, Olutosin Okunoren, Constance Onyiah, Robert Pabst, Antoine Raie, Mathew Roppo, Anna Sheynkman Gorin, Melanie So, Bryan Staniszewski, Brett Stieglitz, Jessica Vavithes, Julie Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
June 22, 2012 Filing 283 DECLARATION of Jennifer Altfeld Landau in Support re: #280 MOTION to Seal Certain Pleadings, Testimony and Exhibits and for Protective Order.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Replacement B)(Landau, Jennifer)
June 22, 2012 Filing 282 DECLARATION of Eileen M. Walsh in Support re: #280 MOTION to Seal Certain Pleadings, Testimony and Exhibits and for Protective Order.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer)
June 22, 2012 Filing 281 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #280 MOTION to Seal Certain Pleadings, Testimony and Exhibits and for Protective Order.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer)
June 22, 2012 Filing 280 MOTION to Seal Certain Pleadings, Testimony and Exhibits and for Protective Order. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(Landau, Jennifer)
June 21, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #276 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 06/15/2012, Receipt Number 1041184. (jd)
June 19, 2012 Filing 279 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Michael C. Kelley dated 6/18/12 re: Counsel for the defendant writes to provide the Court with a copy of KPMG's Responses to plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission. Counsel requests that the Court accept these late responses. ENDORSEMENT: I will accept them. I ask that plaintiff's counsel not engage in a letter war. I will not change my mind. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/19/2012) (mro)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #275 Motion for Steven T. Catelett to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Attorney Steven T. Catlett terminated. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/19/2012) (mro)
June 18, 2012 Filing 277 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #276 Motion for Douglas R. Hart to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/18/2012) (lmb)
June 15, 2012 Filing 276 MOTION for Douglas R. Hart to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(pgu)
June 15, 2012 Filing 275 MOTION for Steven T. Catlett to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(Landau, Jennifer)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #261 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: So ordered. Attorney Wesley D. Felix terminated. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/11/2012) (lmb)
June 9, 2012 Filing 273 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Support re: #270 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ (Part 1 of 2), #37 Exhibit JJ (Part 2 of 2), #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Exhibit LL, #40 Exhibit MM, #41 Exhibit NN, #42 Exhibit OO, #43 Exhibit PP, #44 Exhibit QQ, #45 Exhibit RR, #46 Exhibit SS, #47 Exhibit TT, #48 Exhibit UU, #49 Exhibit VV, #50 Exhibit WW (Part 1 of 3), #51 Exhibit WW (Part 2 of 3), #52 Exhibit WW (Part 3 of 3), #53 Exhibit XX, #54 Exhibit YY, #55 Exhibit ZZ, #56 Exhibit AAA, #57 Exhibit BBB, #58 Exhibit CCC (Part 1 of 8), #59 Exhibit CCC (Part 2 of 8), #60 Exhibit CCC (Part 3 of 8), #61 Exhibit CCC (Part 4 of 8), #62 Exhibit CCC (Part 5 of 8), #63 Exhibit CCC (Part 6 of 8), #64 Errata CCC (Part 7 of 8), #65 Exhibit CCC (Part 8 of 8), #66 Exhibit DDD, #67 Exhibit EEE, #68 Exhibit FFF, #69 Exhibit GGG, #70 Exhibit HHH, #71 Exhibit III, #72 Exhibit JJJ)(Swartz, Justin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/26/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/26/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/26/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 4 replaced on 6/26/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 5 replaced on 6/26/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 6 replaced on 6/26/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 7 replaced on 6/26/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 8 replaced on 6/26/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 9 replaced on 6/26/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 44 replaced on 6/26/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 38 replaced on 7/1/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 42 replaced on 7/1/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 43 replaced on 7/1/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 45 replaced on 7/1/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 21 replaced on 7/1/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 43 replaced on 8/16/2013) (sdi).
June 9, 2012 Filing 272 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #270 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
June 8, 2012 Filing 271 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
June 8, 2012 Filing 270 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. Responses due by 6/29/2012 Return Date set for 7/13/2012 at 12:00 AM.(Swartz, Justin)
June 8, 2012 Filing 269 DECLARATION of Jennifer Altfeld Landau in Support re: #264 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U)(Landau, Jennifer) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/26/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/26/2013) (sdi).
June 8, 2012 Filing 268 DECLARATION of David Butler in Support re: #264 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Landau, Jennifer)
June 8, 2012 Filing 267 DECLARATION of Eileen M. Walsh in Support re: #264 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-II)(Landau, Jennifer) (Main Document 267 replaced on 6/25/2013) (sdi). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2013: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit) (sdi).
June 8, 2012 Filing 266 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer) (Main Document 266 replaced on 6/25/2013) (sdi).
June 8, 2012 Filing 265 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #264 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Landau, Jennifer) (Main Document 265 replaced on 7/1/2013) (sdi).
June 8, 2012 Filing 264 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by KPMG LLP. Responses due by 6/29/2012 Return Date set for 7/13/2012 at 12:00 AM.(Landau, Jennifer)
June 7, 2012 Filing 263 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by David B. Landrum, Miki Nakazawa, Steven G. Ohl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
June 7, 2012 Filing 262 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Gil Ballard on behalf of KPMG LLP (Ballard, Gregory)
June 7, 2012 Filing 261 MOTION for Wesley D. Felix to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(Landau, Jennifer)
June 6, 2012 Filing 260 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Justin M. Swartz dated 6/4/2012 re: Request for a 10 page extension of the 25 page limit to Plaintiffs' brief in support of summary judgment. ENDORSEMENT: Good grief. Yes, take the 10 pages. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/5/2012) (rjm)
June 5, 2012 Filing 259 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Michael A. Levin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
June 5, 2012 Filing 258 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Justin M. Swartz dated 5/31/12 re: Counsel for the plaintiffs writes in response to the two times that defendants have accused them of not telling the truth in their letters today. Counsel also states that on June 1 they wrote to request a one week extension of time to move for summary judgment; counsel has also requested a ten page extension of the 25 page limit for summary judgment. ENDORSEMENT: My ruling does not rest on the "in fighting" or "truth telling." It rests on the fact that I said no more extensions a month ago and I meant it. This motion is supposed to test whether there is a simple way to deal with what will otherwise be a complex lawsuit. I want it done simply. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/5/2012) (mro) Modified on 6/6/2012 (mro).
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Colleen M. Kenney dated 6/4/2012 re: We represent the Defendant KPMG LLP ("KPMG") in the above-entitled action. We write to respectfully request that the Court deny Plaintiffs' request for a second extension of the deadline to file their motion for summary judgment. The parties knew of the schedule and circumstances of which Plaintiffs now complain when the Court granted the prior extension request and ordered that there be "no further extensions" (ECF No. 228). ENDORSEMENT: No extensions received. The end. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/4/2012) (lmb)
June 4, 2012 Filing 256 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Justin M. Swartz dated 6/1/2012 re: We write to respectfully request a one-week extension of Plaintiffs' deadline to file their motion for summary judgment from June 8 to June 15, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: No extension meant no extension. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/4/2012) (lmb)
June 4, 2012 Filing 255 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Obianuju Linda-Mary Ekwegbalu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
May 31, 2012 Filing 254 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Brooke A. Ballance, Kevin Bekas, Emily Barzee Herrick, Taeook Kwon, Trisha Lewis Martin, Erik H. Olsgaard, Vincent Pisano, Colin Shinners, Satomi Takahashi, Ashley Tinnirella, Priya Vasudevan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
May 30, 2012 Filing 253 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Jenna L. Anderson, Christopher D. Bushey, Joon Hwan Byun, Urim Choi, Andrew T. Cox, David Freund, Patrick J. Garbani, Jason Huisman, John Lavin, Jeanette L. Peck, Jonathan Poldan, Jeffrey T. Wong, Anthony C. Zaccarelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
May 29, 2012 Filing 252 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by William J. Cash, Josef H. Farbstein, Omar J. Nieves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
May 29, 2012 Filing 251 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Henry Ymas Crockerham Jr., Leslie Ellen Davis, John DeVecchi Jr., Ashley Rosanne Dwyer, Kevin Joseph Hannan, Amy Hertz, Jing Huang, Mohsan Khan, Lap Shun Ko, Erika Ryan Larson, Peggy Liu, Patrick J. McCadden, Robert M. Merenda Jr., Nitin Mundra, Jared Paul Neeley, Chen Ni, Christina Marjorie Panageotou, Heather R. Rogers, Philip Tuinuku Smith, Kyle Vitale. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
May 29, 2012 Filing 250 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Tania Rhanda Ahmad, Hussein Salim Allibhai, Aubrey Marie Bickmore Neeley, Heather L. Boring, Mark Preston Brough, Andre Comparini, Brittany Nicole Lay, Gregory Alan Morse, Stephanie Pham, Randy R. Placzek, Robert Redling, Amanda Shatzman, Adam Joseph Van De leuv, Karima Warner, Dylan Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
May 29, 2012 Filing 249 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Nathan Andrew Bell, Kristen Burbank, Michael Dean Davis, David Edward Feldman, Leigh Geist, Muhammad Umar Hamid, Katherine Anne Kilgore, Charity Nicole Lee, LaCresha Eronne Millner, Anthony Sassali, Ryan Strout, Daniel Hadi Tabib, Robert C. Thayer, Lina Wang, Angela Guerrero Willhoft. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
May 25, 2012 Filing 248 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Bethany N. Adams, Charles Conrad Boettger, Shawn O. Gillespie, Marina Kalan, Andrew John Leavitt, Albert Li, Sarah L. Luna, Jeffrey P. McNerney, Karen Meyers, Jennifer Rios, Jessica H. Schatz, Lily Situ, Heidi Smilde, Zhen Su, Philip Twede, Flora Kang-Jung Wang, Hua-Jung Yu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sussman, Dana)
May 25, 2012 Filing 247 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Reuben Abitbol, Ari Michael Baruch, Theophilos S. Constantinou, Lisa M. Deane, Matthew R. Griffin, Joseph Kaufman, Leslie Keathley, Stacy McGoldrick, Chengcheng Shi, Kristine P. Somera, Jill Leah Stanley, Annette Sabrina Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sussman, Dana)
May 24, 2012 Filing 246 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Ashley Brooke Strobel, Jessica Marie Bushey, Elizabeth Cho, Mai Endo, Shawn L. Hatfield, Gabriel Kangas, Anthony K. Lagat, Lauren C. Thornton, Michael Welton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
May 23, 2012 Filing 245 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Sharon Brickman, Noelle M. Carlo, Christopher R. Dotson, Cara S. Grieco, Jennifer H. Heist, James D. McClelland, Jr., Lauren A. Morris, Derek W. Richardson, Eric Yee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
May 22, 2012 Filing 244 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kyle L. Fletcher, Olga V. Ivanova-Mendez, Ignatius Jackson, Sean McKenna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
May 21, 2012 Filing 243 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kristie Davis Zapf, Amira Moris Farag-Beshay, Heather L. Hall, Mathew S. Hanley, Francine Hoyle, Lauren E. Inscho, Jennifer Kline, Daniel J. Robertson, Maureen E. Scarff, Anita J. Tse, Munehiko Yuzawa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sussman, Dana)
May 21, 2012 Filing 242 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Myla N. Chatman, Zhanna A. Freeman, Sumiah A. Jaber, Sarah Koneman, Vivian K. Lau, Daniel McCormick, Sandra Rak, David C. Scott, Brian Shaw, Derek P. Snikeris, Ryan M. Spurlock, Kumiko Tanaka, Ellen Volodarsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sussman, Dana)
May 18, 2012 Filing 241 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Maya Abdulkarim, Kenji Nonaka, Robert Vidal III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/22/2012 (kw).
May 16, 2012 Filing 240 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Richard Armstead, Erica Barham, Diego A. Bello, Matthew T. Haines, Amanda B. Kane, Carly N. Kintzing, Kevin M. Olkowski, Maria Rivera, Stephanie T. Unkart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sussman, Dana)
May 16, 2012 Filing 239 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Adesuwa Asemota, Kerry Ann Berg, Ashley Billinger, Daniel Chen, Kelly A. Clark, Jeromy R. Davenport, Mark A. DeBonee, Cristina Marie Del Buono, Stephen F. Endres, Erin M. Everly, Tomoko Furukawa, Andrew J. Gallegos, Rachel L. Guild, Tameka L. Hammond, Andrew Hardy, Dayna E. Kitter, Neil L. Korotkin, Vanyna M. Louis, Katlin A. Mick, Megan Orr, Christen A. Page, Robert M. Petersen, Anton Samrai, Sean Schram, Jennifer D. Sing, Brian D. Stock, Katherine L. Thompson, Ashley M. Turner, Saul Verbera, Jenniffer Vielman-Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sussman, Dana)
May 15, 2012 Filing 238 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Daniel Colvin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sussman, Dana)
May 15, 2012 Filing 237 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b).. Document filed by Juan P. Barajas, Matthew Birmingham, Christopher L. Burgess, Phillip M. Heu-Weller, Tuan Pham, Ronnie Zabiguy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
May 14, 2012 Filing 236 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Nabin Banskota, Theresa Khuu, Samantha M. Snyder (Lance). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 235 SUPPLEMENTAL STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/14/2012) (lmb)
May 11, 2012 Filing 234 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by David P. Grimner, Ronald Karroll, Jr., Matthew A. LaPointe, Jonathan D. Leins, Jacob R. Linville, Ryan Meals, Yuliana Ruff, James K. Russell, Jason Sattar, Noah Sullum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
May 9, 2012 Filing 233 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Julia Abbott, Stephanie M. Aldecoa, Kimberly Argy, Lisa M. Baker, Jessica R. Beckendorf, Joelle M. Brown, Ross Bruening, Jonathan W. Cadwell, David C. Carley, Christine Chiaramonte, Andrew J. Choly, Michael Deter, Nicholas A. Ebersole, Rachel M. English, Sara R. Floreani, Santo S. Gramando III, David Ha, Dalia Klimkowski, Mark Kramer, Christopher K. Lee, Yu Jin Lee, Lucorin J. Mathis, Anthony J. Matulac, Daniel T. McNevin, Kristina Mendez, Amanda Menniti, Joey Rodriguez, Ian A. Ruddock, Daniel R. Sabet, Mia K. Sails, Katrin D. Salta, Fatima Sediqzad, Jeevanjit Singh, Crena E. Sprague, Christopher I. Strother, David Suh, Thomas R. Tarsitano, Edmund Tong, Guillermo E. Trigo-Mendez, Ny-Liang Wang, Richard L. Ward, Alexandra Wittenberger (Bakamus), Billy R. Wleczyk, Erica Yamamoto, Carolyn Yip, Huifang Zhu, Jan-Michael de Vera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/22/2012 (kw).
May 9, 2012 Filing 232 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 5/3/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 9, 2012 Filing 231 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 5/3/2012 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda Fisher, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/4/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/14/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 8, 2012 Filing 230 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Lisa A. Bland (Horton), Kristen N. Kelly, Melissa McQueen Curl, Meredith Rogers (McCarthy), Ryan M. Swaner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
May 7, 2012 Filing 229 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Aaron D. Goodman, Clayton J. Huffman, Ryan J. Keys, Sakina Khan, Xiu T. Khaw, Elizabeth Reisman, David D. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
May 7, 2012 Filing 228 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Justin M. Swartz dated 5/4/2012 re: counsel for plaintiffs respectfully requests that the deadline for the initial Expedited Discovery Period be extended to June 1, 2012. We also request that the summary judgment briefing schedule be moved forward two weeks, as follows: Summary judgment motions: June 8, 2012, Opposition briefs: June 29, 2012, Reply briefs: July 13, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: OK but no further extensions., ( Motions due by 6/8/2012., Responses due by 6/29/2012, Replies due by 7/13/2012., Discovery due by 6/1/2012.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/7/2012) (pl)
May 4, 2012 Filing 227 CONSENT TO JOIN CLASS. Document filed by Maria del Mar Hernandez, Carmen M. Tellez, Megan E. Toms (Humber). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
May 3, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Status Conference held on 5/3/2012. (rjm)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 226 STIPULATION REGARDING CERTAIN DISCOVERY MATTERS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, that: KPMO need not produce information responsive to Plaintiffs' discovery requests by searching the email accounts or other electronically-stored information (which includes hard drives, network drives, flash drives, CD/DVD's, or other media for storing electronically-stored information) of Plaintiffs, Opt-Ina, or their individual performance managers/reviewers ("Plaintiff-Related ESI") during the Expedited Discovery Period. Plaintiff-Related ESI discovery is deferred until the Further Discovery Period without prejudice as further set forth within this Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 5/3/2012) (jfe)
May 3, 2012 Filing 225 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Justin B. Cook, Diana A. McArdle, Penelope Yurkovich (Normandin). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
May 2, 2012 Filing 224 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Del Ciela Basilio, Emily Boeckmann, Sarah E. Callan Stanclift, Winnie Chan, Logan J. Christianson, Robert S. Chun, Adam D. Colba, Michael D. Coriell, Michael W. Derington, Michael J. Fedun, Brittany L. Fedun (Figliolino), Christopher M. Ferrell, Zeb F. High, Jr., Rachel Houdek, Preston Jeung, Sunita Kumar, Andrew V. Linville, Kevin M. McBride, Elijah McIntosh, Steven A. Mich, Eric Nowakowski, Stacie M. Onken, Yulia Shmatkova, Michael T. Storin, Adam Travis, Samantha Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
May 1, 2012 Filing 223 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Emily R. Boriack, Trent C. Brown, Connor Donnelly, Peter J. Helf, Chad B. Underwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 30, 2012 Filing 222 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Selena R. Bailey, Colleen Brennan, Kristina M. Bross, Elizabeth D. Brown, Christopher J. Calvey, Lauren Danielle Caplan, Susan Chartier (Gomes), David E. Chinoski, Kristen M. Coulombe, Christine DeBonee (Labrie), Kristina Eng, Vincente Figueroa, Hayley L. Ford, Abby Griesedieck (Reeves), Dawson Hale, Jordan A. Handsaker, Caleb E. Hanson, Amanda S. Hoffman, Alaina Jo, Jeffery V. Kent, Jr., Kyle E. Langner, Reanna D. Leitaker, Michael L. Lembo, Edward H. Levy, Marvin K. Mayotte, Rachel N. Otley, Daniel Parks, Carol A. Parrish, David Piatek, Michael D. Pick, Yanina Reznikov, Marisa Salerno, Aubrey A. Schmidt, Lennon Smith, Eun Hye Sung, Thai Trinh, Shavon Tucker, Michael Vahidtari, Aiman M. Wahdan, Mathieu Weill, Geneva Wigfall, Matthew E. Wren, Dosanna Wu, Daniel Wullschleger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 27, 2012 Filing 221 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Shahan Ahmed, Ronald F. Beck, T'Lane B. Briggeman, Teresa Carranza, Kristen Chong, Nicole C. Doran, Kunal Dudheker, Thomas Dufresne, Shane Huiberts, Robert Karr, Thomas P. Keegan, Rebecca A. Krammen, Monica L. Long, Shuang Lu, Keenan James McCullough, Trevor D. McKendrick, Kelly Meriano, Steven Murphey, Megumi Komiya Nakamura, Michelle Okabe, Nicholas A. Paonessa, Sean M. Paul, Neil Shah, Rayna J. Swanson, Thosana Tan, Sergey Tkachev, Tracie Togami, Krystle Tolentino, Moony C. Tong, Kenneth Ty, Stephen Van Lyon, Sarah Vanlandingham, Katrinaca E. Ware, Victoria E. Whelan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sussman, Dana)
April 27, 2012 Filing 220 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Francis Adams, Hermine Barseghian, Jennifer K. Bauman, Allison Chen, Brandon Gemoll, Christine Ann Gibson, Alexander J. Gilbertson, John Steven Hilborn, Heidi Lynn Holmes, Connie Horng, David Kang, Carli Kisaba, Cristobal Lamas, Allison Leigh Moore, Austin R. Lewis, Brennan J. Maloney-Krips, Amanda J. Myers, Bryan Patrick Nelson, Eric M. Pannell, Cody Parker, Ankur B. Patel, Joel B. Rintoul, Brett I. Silverman, AnnMarie Stuart, Jovan Tucker, Alexander Vyshetsky, Ashley N. Westmoreland, Calvin Wu, Angela Yu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 26, 2012 Filing 219 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Justin M. Swartz dated 4/24/12 re: Counsel for the plaintiffs requests an extension of plaintiffs' time to submit a letter describing the discovery they seek to compel, from today to 4/27/12 at noon. Defendant consents to plaintiffs' request on the condition that the time to file their response letter is extended by one day, to 5/1/12. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 4/26/2012) (mro)
April 26, 2012 Filing 218 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Jillian M. McCool, Katsiaryna Tsybina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 25, 2012 Filing 217 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Adam G. Avni, Elizabeth H. Cunningham, Pattanan Decharaveeroj, Melissa K. Langone, Meng-Lin (Mona) Lu, David C. Orasin, Holly M. Saxby (Sowersby), Daniel P. Thor, Kelly Yi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 24, 2012 Filing 216 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kathleen M. Autry, Briana G. Bishop, Wendy R. Dalrymple, Edward Demone, Steven P. Duffy, Madison R. Duvall, Grace T. Gutberlet, Justin T. Maier, Bradley A. OMalley, Daniel Rex, Sarah J. Ross, Steven T. Shulthiess, Allison K. Slife (Hritz), Michelle L. Szames, Adrienne D. Tanker, Courtney Ann Wiegard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 23, 2012 Filing 215 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Lauren Lippincott Darsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 23, 2012 Filing 214 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Steven T. Catlett dated 4/20/2012 re: The parties jointly request an informal conference with the Court pursuant to Local Rule 37.2 to discuss issues at the Court's earliest convenience. ENDORSEMENT: A conference will be held on May 3, 2012 at 3 p.m. Parties are to submit letters of no longer then 5 pages on the schedule proposed (i.e., plaintiffs' letter due by close of business on seventh business day before the conference and Defendants' submission due on third business day before the conference). Please contact Chambers to find out which Courtroom in which the conference will take place. ( Status Conference set for 5/3/2012 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 4/23/2012) (jfe)
April 20, 2012 Filing 213 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Wassim Berro, Hector Estrada, Julian D. Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 19, 2012 Filing 212 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Benjamin B. Anderson, Scott Campobenedetto, Jenna N. Cofman, Michael Crnkovich, Faical Elhajjam, Bond N. Ferguson (Munson), Timothy D. Johnston, Bryan A. Keele, Davona Kelly, Yelena Kotsar, Constance Leung, Meng Lor, Sarah McCue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 18, 2012 Filing 211 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by David B. Bawel, Kingman Chan, Jr., Megan Erwin, Javonna E. James, Bradley T. Owens, Keith B. Papish, Lynn K. Spokas, Michael W. Truettner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 17, 2012 Filing 210 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Amber M. Ahsmann (Golden), Margaret L. Aycock, Sarah N. Bocks, Mathew Brinsden, Jamie Buenzow, James A. Bumbulsky, Rinky Chopra, Kimberly C. Conner, Katie Cox (Westgard), Mark J. DeLuca, Anna C. Gullickson, Thomas Histed, Alyson P. LeDesky, Douglas D. Martine, Paul M. Mastarone, Rebecca J. Mastarone (Elliott), Craig McNeill, Pedro Laborde Muniz, Nichole A. Serino, Marc Jacob Shelton, Chau M. Ta, Evan L. Wilk, Megan Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 16, 2012 Filing 209 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Jeffrey W. Barlam, Matthew M. Clayton, Shelley Gulati, Christina Ruiz, Tyler J. Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 13, 2012 Filing 208 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Michael S. Becker, Jeffrey Bland, Adam L. Bockman, Ronak Brahmbhatt, Irina Brimmell, Kelvin G. Cheng, Meghan R. Cooper, Sean P. Fischer, Marcus A. Flynn, Sarah N. Harper, Paulette M. Heur, Loretta G. Hill, Kelsey E. Hofacer (Neel), Weili Hsu, David A. Johansson, Amanda K. Johnson, Robert D. Jones, Valerie T. Kaufman, Paul W. Kemp, Kevin D. Knipp, Merlyn A. Kushner, Adam D. Lake, Allison A. Leslie, Kang Li, Sara Maggio, Anne Male, Adam T. Marchant, Marissa Mayhorn, Terrance L. McKnight, Jonathan T. McPharlin, Robert J. Miranda, Kristen L. Muncie, Aliesha Nathu, Elizabeth A. Palmeri, Matthew C. Reighard, William B. Ross, Poonam Sakhrani, Elizabeth M. Simmons, Stephanie C. Snodgrass, Justin Spike, Saron H. Tegegne, Katie L. Thomas (Jackson), Maria G. Trujillo, Kiera J. Watson, Eric R. Wilson, Eric Yu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 12, 2012 Filing 207 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Xiaojuan Chen, Ebony Harris, James Rinaldi, Stacey M. Zafiroff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 11, 2012 Filing 206 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Artsiom Anisko, Karishma Barua, Jiesi Chen, Shannon Comrie-Booth, Zachariah Cooper, Jeremy P. Dugan, Nathaniel Edelman, Edward A. Garcia, Keiko Hirakawa, Connie M. Hu, Bradley K. Jastrow, Xuejiao Jiang, Anthony Kimani, Emily Kupec, Samuel A. Kuznetzoff, Timothy D. Long, Michelle S. Luk, Timothy I. Miller, Mary E. Nadjarian, Kelly Price, Janette Ricks, Ivi Santoso, Bryan Schroeder, Alexandra K. Snukal, Young Tak Song, Shirley-May Soong, Mikiko Sugaya, Christine Sullivan (Fraga), James R. Taylor, Jennifer Thompson (Peter), Nestor Urita, Jr., Jay M. Verrill, Travis J. Viera, Winly Vuong, Valerie Ware, Angela Wen-an Yu, Denise Worsley, Jonathan W. Wright, Thomas X. Yao. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 10, 2012 Filing 205 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Lillian N. Fraguada Vializ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 9, 2012 Filing 204 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by John C. Adrian, Kyle L. Alexander, Ailda Alushi, Charles W. Crawford, Erin Diffley, Jenni L. Dollahon, Holly C. Donley, Megan R. Gilbertson, Benjamin D. Goode, Erica A. Goode, Kara A. Paluch (Schroder), Danielle M. Roche (Duplessis), Lauren Sellari (Huff), Terese V. Strehlow, Katherine A. Sweet, Scott D. Unnerstall, Qiong Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 9, 2012 Filing 203 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Brian Ascencio, Kerri Blum, Kyle V. Brown, Thaddaeus M. Burgess, Nathan E. Carlton, Petruta L. Gantoi, Michael D. Gogolen, Rondal Harris, Jr., Tamara R. Hook, Michinori Kaneko, Sara Lee, Fadil Limani, Prparime Limani, Jennifer A. Matous, Sean A. McGovern, Brittany L. Pancheri, Kelly B. Posten, Jessica R. Preston, Thomas A. Reid, David Charles Robertson, Alison M. Rooney, Jillian Schlaud, Robert L. Schlaud, Jr., Jacob O. Tech, Justin M. Terzo, Wondirad A. Tsegaye, Edward A. Valentino, Christopher A. Welch, David C. Whitney, Andrew J. Zens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 6, 2012 Filing 202 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Myra S. Aslam, Charles Baumann, Stephen Boscola, Alison G. Brooks, Ryan D. Carr, Brian J. Cogley, Jessica R. Conway, Timothy DeLuca, Bobbie Jo Emond, Ashley E. Falter, David S. Guy, Tanya R. Mazakian, Megan L. Opsahl, Julian Paik, Jeffrey W. Paramore, Arpan Patel, Alana Perini, Lauren Plumley, David B. Reiter, Steven B. Russell, Jordan Samet, Ross Silverman, Matthew Skellan, Rachel A. Stuart, Gordon E. Walters, Peter W. Wong, Kevin W. Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 4, 2012 Filing 201 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Spiro M. Dounis, Paul Kreger, Leo A. Matz, Kin Kei Kevin Mok, Nicholas S. Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 3, 2012 Filing 200 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Yim Chi Cheng, Virginia Grzenia, Pamela S. Lee, Natalie M. Marshall, Charles E. Mertz II, Jill N. Minshew, Shawn M. Parent, Robert G. Pyrz, Matthew Schwerin, Paul R. Scott, Richard S. Seger III, Sarah R. Sims, Uyen Tran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 3, 2012 Filing 199 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Marc C. Abraham, Justin N. Beebe, Katherine M. Beebe (Pickert), Christine L. Blaylock, Gaelan Boss, Anna E. Broudy, Colleen M. Catalano, Eric Dickinson, Manal Elhag, John G. Estelle, John P. Harris, Andrea Henry (Speck), Jennifer L. Howell, John M. Jambers, Diana S. Johnston, James R. Kirihara, Julie M. Knight, David Koehler, Michael H. Lovecraft, Kevin (Keun) W. Pak, Matthew A. Pitetti, Christine A. Reed, Leigh Anne Rozycki, Megan P. Sato, Melissa Stokes, Matthew S. Taylor, Ken Ukai, Lazarus W. Vittas, Erin C. Walls, Dustin F. White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/22/2012 (kw).
April 2, 2012 Filing 198 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by William L. Fine, Amy A. Hillenbrand, Stephanie N. Johnson, Benjamin Jurgens, Philip Mezheritsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 197 JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel for Plaintiffsand Defendant. that:1. The close of the Expedited Discovery Period shall be May 18, 2012.2. Any discovery disputes related to the Expedited Discovery Period thatthe Parties cannot reso1ve are hereby referred to the Magistrate Judge.3. The Parties shall file summary judgment motions by May 25, 2012. 4. Oppositions to such motions shall be filed by June 15, 2012. 5. Replies shall be filed by June 29, 2012. Motions due by 5/25/2012. Responses due by 6/15/2012 Replies due by 6/29/2012. Discovery due by 5/18/2012. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/2/2012) (js)
March 30, 2012 Filing 196 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Brent E. Arnold, Yaelle E. Bernstein, YuQuin Wen Bohannon, Evelyn Chan, Thomas J. Chloe, Evan M. Dashe, Joseph Gentzkow, Karen L. Juan, John P. Kindelin, Jackson Y. Kuo, Janice Luo, Gregory T. Montgomery, Lisa M. Morgado, Andrew J. Porubcan, Jing Tao, Takeo Uchida, Jason R. Walter, Chun Y. Zhang, Su Zheng. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 29, 2012 Filing 195 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Sumi Choi, Alexandra D. Chou, Ashley Peyton Disinger, Catherine E. Kaylor, Sara Lengler, Steven S. Merrill, Denaimou C. N'Garsanet, Laura Rath, Laura Elizabeth Reynolds, LeShawd T. Thompson, Patrick A. Thompson, Matthew D. Ytzen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 28, 2012 Filing 194 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Max H. Essoh, Patrick Michael Funk, Patrick C. Ofordire, Derek Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 27, 2012 Filing 193 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Melissa L. Brown, Danielle L. Cahill, Natalie C. Cusat, Krysten M. Genaway, Andrew T. Kwitowski, Savannah Lehman, William S. Lockard III, Alanna J. Zahora. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 27, 2012 Filing 192 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Ashley A. Adeogba, Jennifer L. Arthur, Nina J. Aves, Drew M. Biddle, Alisha Brumbaugh, Heather Buss, Diana Chia, Janice Daclan, Joseph Decardi-Nelson, Eric Hills, Jaime Hinojosa, Farah Khan, Galib R. Khan, Hyangsoon Lee, Joseph N. Levy, Maile M. Lewis, Jessica H. Lott, Miguel A. Marin, Dean Mattera, Danielle A. McCoy, Allison McGuire, Steven Oscarson, Joseph J. Rother, Ann Salinas, Chipman R. Seale, Young Seoh Lee, Antonios A. Spiliotopoulos, Mina Lisa Teymourtash, Shun Tung Lam, Jeannine Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sussman, Dana)
March 27, 2012 Filing 191 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Vincent J. Battaglia, Jr., Sadie L. Carson, Thomas A. Chon, William E. Cloutet III, Matthew B. Daniels, Michelle Epstein, Stacey Gill, Lynnie Hickey-Mehic, Vanita Katrina, Tie G. Lasater, Keely O. Lindstadt, Scott E. Midla, Neil M. Morgan, Michelle L. Mysuna, Margo Pacanowski, Zachary J. Pettinger, Samantha Richards, Thomas W. Scott, Tyler Skelton, Joshua D. Smith, Rainy Leforce Spring, Kathryn E. Towle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 26, 2012 Filing 190 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Yoana Allen, Katherine L. Aye, Casey J. Hocevar, Brittany K. Hopp, Samantha D. Leonard, Timothy McCormack, Eric D. Mead, Sarah E. Morgan, Jason Rosiello, John M. Schenk, Galen P. Ward, Togos Zorig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 26, 2012 Filing 189 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Brandon D. Bhagat, Justin B. Bobus, Warren Chen, Aaron Cheung-Kwong Chan, Jason Dale, Donna V. De Vera, BeiLai Ge, Brandon Russell George, Ying Chen McEwen, Ani Susan Menendian, David J. Murray, Katherine L. Nordman, Katharine Omura, Domenico Pontrelli, Sergio D. Ramos, Allison K. Sanden, Kundan Sandhu, Melissa S. Scalici, Lauren Schaefer, Jessica H. Schatz, Chanelle Takemoto, Nathan L. Wilbur, Vera Zhuravleva, Inessa Zolotareva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sussman, Dana)
March 23, 2012 Filing 188 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by John M. Butler, Adam Chrudimsky, Caitlin C. Clark, Zachary J. Cyman, James R. Duncan III, Christopher Furlong, Matthew C. Gadzinski, Dylan C. Gfeller, Ethan J. Giller, Kristina M. Harrison, Kristin N. Hoffman, Chris Jones, Genna N. Love, Ashley Prosek, Jolene N. Rabena, Michael Spano, Timothy J. Strehlow, Gregory S. Torbic, Thomas B. Wilson, Stephanie A. Yesnofski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sussman, Dana)
March 23, 2012 Filing 187 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Stephanie M. Adams, Nicole Elizabeth Anderson, Amir F Aslam, Nathan Edward Bertsch, Paula A. Boone, Christopher Capicotto, Dong Chen, Joel Coffey, David Curtis, Janine Joyce De Jesus, Dominika Ewa Pabon, Arley R. Ewald, Lauren Goldfarb, Bonni Grossman, Scott T. Jugan, Sara A. Lasek, Pietro Maddalena, Johnathan Marr, Rebecca Mielnik, Bogdan Milin, Charlotte Nicholson, Jason Owen, Elliot Parks, Vincent J. Passafiume, Morgan M. Pearson, John M. Pontecorvo, Lauren T. Quinn, Miran Seo, Gina Tricarico, Ramon Valls, Dana M. Van Nostrand, Valarie Anne Vaughan, Jonathan R. Warriner, Hillel Weingarten, Hui Zhi, Yi Zou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sussman, Dana)
March 22, 2012 Filing 186 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Amir Ali, Amy H. Brousse, Enoch Chung, Dennis M. Delude, Karen E. Gorzynski, Oscar Londono, Sophie Y. Malati, Andrea S. Mosher, Ashley Phillips, Matthew A. Ross, Amanda Rubeor, Damon T. Smith, Kyle A. Starr, Ariel Taylor, Michael T. Visconto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 21, 2012 Filing 185 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Nathan Fedders, Christina Spannos (Papscoe), Kristen Troia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 20, 2012 Filing 184 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Joshua D. Bicknell, Christopher M. Chiaraluce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 19, 2012 Filing 183 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Johnny Acosta, Jonathan Bingham, Julia Bushe, Kyle Joseph Chagnon, Laurie Chen, James A. Dorey, Laura Guarraci, John R. Hamill III, Jeniffer Shea Kratville, Justin S. Norton, Gayle Robin Patasnik, Eric Joseph Paulson, Jessica Erin Simpson, Christopher O. Weiss, Justin Gregory Wicks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth) Modified on 3/23/2012 (kw).
March 19, 2012 Filing 182 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Michael D. DAntonio, Sarah Giltner, Michelle D. Harris, Tracey Monday, Shannon Lee Morrow, Luisana Bonilla OBrien, Zachary A. Schamaun, Vanette E. Torres, Mark Van Winter, Thomas J. Zubulake. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sussman, Dana)
March 19, 2012 Filing 181 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Cant Charles Christopher, Stephanie R. Conti, Aren J. Cowan, Bryan Davis, Edward Diasio, Andrea Diaz, Cara Ann Juffer, Brent E. McLaren, Alvaro Narvaez, Anthony Nusbaum, Brianna R. Truex, Brian S. Zalewski, Bryan Kyle Zerr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sussman, Dana)
March 19, 2012 Filing 180 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Sisai A. Birhanu, Vanessa Burns, Keri A. Ehrlich, Seth T. Fick, Jennifer C. Hall, Mathew J. Howard, Katherine R. Johnston, Benjamin J. Siewart, Megan Eileen Smith, Andrew J. Terreri, Amy Elizabeth Vogt, Jessica Leigh Williams, Elissa Sheryl Yorgey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sussman, Dana)
March 16, 2012 Filing 179 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Michael Arcuri, Drew R. Froehlich, Jennifer M. Interlandi, Michael A. Jablonski, Michelle M. Krause, Casey Lock, Scott R. Nunez, Priya Patel, Kate Pinney, Amanda L. Shay, Indre Stunzenas, Kaliope Tsoflias. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 16, 2012 Filing 178 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Rongchen Chen, Sophia Chowdhury, Ryan L. Christie, Sarah F. Kuhne, Samantha S. Liao, Thomas F. Lisnich, Yu-Han Lo, Rebecca Mosher, Terryann A. Roberts, Renee A. Sapp, Shirley Suet Wai So, Yuliya Spektor, Tracy A. Tankard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 16, 2012 Filing 177 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by David W. Allen, Amanda Authement, Daniel A. Bennett, Leif E. Bergquist, Heather K. Blake, Kerry L. Blatt, Lauren M. Brown, Emma Colacicco, Laura Davidson, Adele M. Domingue, April L. Doten, James W. Forsythe, Lacy R. Glaser, Dylan M. Johnson, Jeremy R. Johnson, Jenna H. Karmel, Amit Kukreja, Jason Lalk, Daniel N. Marrone, Glenn Palilla, Jennifer M. Peyton, Amanda Rahner, Fay M. Richards, Dino J. Rossi, Christina Ruiz Minesis, Cesaria Rutigliano, Frank R. Sousa, Hana Stelzer, Idrees Tily, Cheryl Tripodi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 15, 2012 Filing 176 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Stacia Charland, Jennifer L. Crowe, Jonathan DeBeaumont, Marc Ferriello, Dana Marie Gansky, Ashley S. Guthmann, John Hays, Jeremy D. Kline, Kelly Marie Lock, Sarah Tucker Mahar, Krista Suzanne Niebrugge, Ryan Ray Olsen Painter, Kristina Rengel, Christina M. Saia, Ann Patricia Salamunovich, Donald Shaw, Brent Vetter, Rong Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 14, 2012 Filing 175 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216 (b). Document filed by Atul Prasad Adhikary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth) Modified on 3/23/2012 (kw).
March 14, 2012 Filing 174 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Chelsea Neale Collins, Joshua Timothy Dahmen, Ashley A. Darden, Nicole Davis, Jared Brice Filus, Ashley Holman, Jessica Minor, Melissa Mulick, Wei Song, Brian Walker, Chad W. Wonderling, Kelsea Echo Yu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 14, 2012 Filing 173 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b).. Document filed by Kara N. Bevis, Stephanie Eckardt, Kevin Ellis, Joseph F. Franzone, Kristopher Glaser, Samantha M. Hunt, Matej Kollar, Paul A. Larkins, Kimberly Layden, Joseph T. Leonard, Sarah K. Lindholm, Kristen McFarland, Rebecca O'Malley, Luke Orszag, Katherine A. Panzarella, Magen M. Reyor, Rohini R. Seth, Shailesh Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 14, 2012 Filing 172 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b).. Document filed by Emilie J. Britt, Jesus Comendeiro, Frederick James Cowan Jr., Jina Han, Geffery Hubble, Jessica H. Leonard, Ian Nichols, Drew Harris Rosen, Jacob Spear, Jonathan Wiener. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 14, 2012 Filing 171 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by David Jalette, Ashley Matrak, Andrew Pulitano, Alyson L. Reimer, Alla Shutyi, Bryan Van Demark, Da Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 13, 2012 Filing 170 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Alanna Cooper, Erin Elizabeth Donia, Brian Ross Dout, Erika Elko, Erin J. Elliot, Chase Michael Gardner, Kyle Andrew Gasaway, Sean Paul Hathorn, Rennie Henry, Thomas M. Kerr III, Maura Helberg Lange, James J. Lenihan III, Trinity Marcia Mascola, Julian Joaquin Murrieta, Nicholas Paul Nordman, Alan William Roeder, Matthew Wenzel, Laura Westensee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sussman, Dana)
March 12, 2012 Filing 169 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kayla L. Barrett, Niles Reid Bergstrom, Jill Kayleen Colgan, Kayla Marie Futch, Joseph Gibson, Kaitlyn Hartwell, Allison C. Hylton, Daniel P. Jensen, Lukasz Kwiatkowski, Daniela Lundin, Alison J. Moss, Irfan A. Raza, Jatinder Singh, Jin Xing Wang (Xue). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 12, 2012 Filing 168 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Sreya S. Alex (Samuel), Kerri J. Allen, Steven Calder, Cairo J. Carr, Sho Chinen, Davin Lee Cottle, Jeffrey M. Croft, Jacqueline Marie DeMeo, Jessica Deyo, Allison Peltier Gillam, William T. Gutknecht, Christian Ryan Daniel Halligan, Jennifer L. Johnson, Christopher W. King, Brett E. Kirkland, Mark Edward Martinez, Daniel Mattar, Jana Milenky Weissman, Bradford Moye, Maya E. Procinsky, Michael Rath, Xuemei Ren, Michael L. Steele, Ryan S. Svorinic, Ryan Verkamp, Yuan Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 12, 2012 Filing 167 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Justin M. Swartz dated 3/9/2012 re: Counsel for the plaintiffs request a referral to the Magistrate Judge for assistance in resolving certain discovery disputes, or, in the alternative for leave to raise them with the Court. ENDORSEMENT: I did not "wipe the slate clean". I expected the lawyers for both sides to narrow their requests and responses in light of my views on how we should deal with the pending issues. If KPMG is unwilling to cooperate in that endeavor, I will just abandon my effort to streamline the case, give you 6 months (no more) to complete ALL discovery, merits & expert, and let you have at it. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/12/2012) (ft)
March 12, 2012 Filing 166 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Motion held on 3/2/2012 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vincent Bologna, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/5/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 12, 2012 Filing 165 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 3/2/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 12, 2012 Filing 164 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 3/2/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 9, 2012 Filing 163 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelcie Kiku Balaeff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 9, 2012 Filing 162 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Jason T. Bailey, Eve Buckwalter, Elizabeth Lea Chandler, Mallory Brown Hoidal, Zachary A. Kayser, William Robert Kraft, Jake Kransteuber, Michael McPherson, David Craig Roberts, Erin M. Roberts, Scott Rumberg, Sean W. Sullivan, Xuan Sun, Matthew Trinh, Travis J. Vogt, Jaison Vovra, Hong F. Walrond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 8, 2012 Filing 161 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Jillian Bernard, Joanna Canaras, Zahra J. Castillo, Michael Chiulli, Shirley Jean Criddle, Shannon Cunniffe, Matthew Giammarinaro, Jennifer M. Grayson, Joe Manuel Guerrero, Luke Cletus Iverson, Wieslawa Jamroz, Matthew Kunz, James W. Lee III, Jeffrey Manning, Ryan B. Markowitz, Sarah Jane Medrano, Robert A. Miller, Kanuri Bhanu Priya, Kristen Leigh Provix, Peter John Puglisi III, Michael Santolucito, Laura Shumake Savarese, Juliet Lee Smith, Matthew B. Smith, William S. Tierno, Joseph Walter Vazzano, Suihong Wang, Laura Ann Westenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 8, 2012 Filing 160 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Daniel Andrews, Brian Edward Capstick, Harrison D Cole, Christopher Blake Elliot, Daega Fatah, Clifford Hayhurst III, Corey Jones, Christopher A Marino, Anne M Martin, Evan R Parzych, Heather Jean Reeves Prudhomme, Andrew Rehm, Emilio Jorge Sartori, Heather Schrader, Chava S. Schwartz, Brian Edward Stamile, Michael Ian Tarrant, Christopher Adam Wade, Evan M Zawatsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sussman, Dana)
March 8, 2012 Filing 159 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Adam Minsky, Alex Cook, Alexander L Diaz, Anna Huang, Ashlee S Verner, Benjamin D Harmon, Brandon Burkley, Caitlin A Tennant, Carolyn Elizabeth Mahar (Hassel), Diana Fazylova, Dominica Barber, Dowling Burke Stough, Robert Dustin Cathcart, Elisa Lee Hua Wu, Edmund A Windsor, Eric Van Fredricksen, Erin Elizabeth Hart, Erin S Saunders, Garrett Dee Cazier, Gregory Goldsand, Holland Stimac, Jack Yi-Ping Tang, James Douglas Nelson, Jeffrey G Pike, Jennifer Lai, Jennifer M Stewart, Jennifer Mills, Jeremy T Fowler, Jessica P Puckett, Jia Yin Wu, John Deng, Lauren Elizabeth Friends, Lela Mujakovic, Leslie L Perrine, Lindsey McLaughlin, Lisa Grund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sussman, Dana)
March 8, 2012 Filing 158 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b).. Document filed by Marilyn Louis, Mario Fani, Mark Nixdorf, Mary Benson Smith, Matthew Mills, Meghan E. O'Malley, Melissa Gerdung, Michael Weichholz, Michael Yoo, Mitchell A. Melfi, Morgan Ann Frame, Nicole M. Anderson, Nimish Patel, Olga Martynov, Orealis Marie Alvarado, Paras H. Dagli, Peter Panagos, Rena Zarah, Robert Liu, Samuel Robert Young, Scott Lorence Pfister, Seville Nicole Christmas, Steven Gaul, Sue Yen Chong, Svetlana Condur, Tiffany Chua Chan, Tyrone Guillory Jr., Valerie Tang, William Drzich, William Baxter, Yelena Glants, Yuk N. Li, Yulia Barland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagoner, Elizabeth)
March 8, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #151 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 03/02/2012, Receipt Number 1031416. (jd)
March 7, 2012 Filing 157 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A, 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Parissa Hannah Daneshmand, John Edward Glockzen, Jr., Ciara Marino, William Waits Raulerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swartz, Justin)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER OF ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #151 Motion for Colleen M. Kenney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby Ordered that Colleen M. Kenney is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for KPMG LLP. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/7/2012) (mro)
March 7, 2012 Filing 155 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 3/2/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 7, 2012 Filing 154 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 3/2/2012 before Judge Colleen McMahon. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/2/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 6, 2012 Filing 153 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kimberly Danielle Blaise, Vanessa Angelin Castano, Regina V. Farrell, Daniel Huey, Donald Richard Karr, Richard N. Tinelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swartz, Justin)
March 6, 2012 Filing 152 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Ashley Albers Austin, Jae Y. Chung, Christopher John Howe Collato, Paul James DiCarlo, Ryan Farrell Holmes, Matthew John Jefferies, Russell James Monson, Neil Thomas Punt, Emily Diane Towers, Mark M. Ulrich, Matthew William Wilpers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swartz, Justin)
March 5, 2012 Filing 150 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Christopher John Howe Collato, Matthew John Jefferies, Russell James Monson, Neil Thomas Punt, Mark M. Ulrich, Paul James DiCarlo, Matthew William Wilpers, Jae Y. Chung, Ashley Albers Austin, Emily Diane Towers, Ryan Farrell Holmes.(Swartz, Justin) Modified on 3/6/2012 (ka).
March 2, 2012 Filing 151 MOTION for Colleen M. Kenney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(arc)
March 2, 2012 Filing 149 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Paul Thomas Morrone.(Bien, Rachel)
March 2, 2012 Filing 148 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Mona Aflatooni.(Bien, Rachel)
March 2, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen McMahon: Status Conference held on 3/2/2012. Decision: Status conference held. The parties are to confer and present a new summary judgment schedule to the Court. (Submitted by Benjamin T. Alden). (mde)
March 1, 2012 Filing 147 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Marc Ryan Fillari.(Bien, Rachel)
March 1, 2012 Filing 146 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Steven T. Catlett dated 2/29/12 re: Counsel for the defendant writes jointly with the plaintiffs to request that the date for making discovery responses be extended briefly to March 7, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: We will discuss everything tomorrow. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/1/2012) (mro)
February 29, 2012 Filing 145 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Ahn Romero.(Bien, Rachel)
February 28, 2012 Filing 144 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Elizabeth Wagoner dated 2/28/2012 re: Counsel for the plaintiffs request an adjournment of the scheduled pre-trial conference. ENDORSEMENT: No - I am on trial - Send someone else - it must be by Friday. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/28/2012) (ft)
February 27, 2012 Filing 143 CALENDAR NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 3/2/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/27/2012) (cd)
February 21, 2012 Filing 142 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Tammie Fossaceca.(Bien, Rachel)
February 21, 2012 Filing 141 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Wakana Kamesato Sebacher.(Bien, Rachel)
February 17, 2012 Filing 140 ANSWER to #51 Amended Complaint. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(Kaplan, Alex)
February 17, 2012 Filing 139 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Steven T. Catlett dated 2/17/2012 re: The parties jointly respectfully request that the Court extend the deadline to object to discovery from today, February 17, 2012 at 5:00 p.m. to Wednesday, February 22, 2012 at 5:00 p.m. (since Monday, February 20, 2012 is a court holiday). ENDORSEMENT: OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/17/2012) (lmb)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/16/2012) (mro)
February 14, 2012 Filing 137 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A, U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Joshua Adam Mandelberger.(Bien, Rachel)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Steven T. Catlett dated 2/8/2012 re: Counsel for the defendant requests that the Court extend the deadline set in yesterday's order from 5 p.m. today, to 5 p.m. on Wednesday, February 15. ENDORSEMENT: O.K. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/8/2012) (ft)
February 7, 2012 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #135 Order to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (ab)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER: Plaintiffs' reply papers at ECF No. 87 are to be unsealed, and KPMG is directed to file on the docket unredacted copies of any documents that KPMG previously filed with redactions by 5pm, February 8. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/27/2012) (ab)
February 6, 2012 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ama)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO THE DISCOVERY ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE JAMES L. COTT DATED OCTOBER 7, 2011 denying #109 Motion for an Order Denying Defendants Objections. KPMG's motion is DENIED in its entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove the motion at Docket No. 109 from the Court's list of outstanding motions. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/3/2012) (ft)
January 19, 2012 Filing 133 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Stephen Marsala, Jr.(Bien, Rachel)
January 18, 2012 Filing 132 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Lisa B. Fraley.(Bien, Rachel)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Justin Swartz dated 1/13/2012 re: Accordingly, Plaintiffs respectfully request that the Court allow them to insert "April 15, 2008 in the Proposed Notice where it reads "Date to Be Determined by Court." Defendant consents to this request. We thank the Court for its consideration. ENDORSEMENT: Order amended accordingly - why didn't YOU put the correct date in? (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/17/2012) (djc) Modified on 1/18/2012 (djc).
January 6, 2012 Filing 130 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Steven T. Catlett dated 1/5/12 re: Counsel for the defendant requests permission to communicate further with the Court on the discovery issue by the close of business on Monday, 1/9/12. ENDORSEMENT: Ok. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/6/2012) (mro)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION AND COURT-AUTHORIZED NOTICE granting #33 Motion to Certify Class. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion for conditional class certification, court-authorized notice pursuant to section 216(b) of the FLSA, and an order directing KPMG to provide Plaintiffs, within 30 days, a computer-readable list containing all potential collective action members' names, last known mailing addresses, last known telephone numbers, email addresses, work locations, and dates of employment. The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove the motion at Docket No. 33 from the Court's list of outstanding motions. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/3/2012) (ft)
December 22, 2011 Filing 128 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Hal B. Anderson, New Attorney: Gregg I. Shavitz, Address: SHAVITZ LAW GROUP, P.A., 1515 S. Federal Hwy, Suite 404, Boca Raton, Florida, 33432, 561-447-8888. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shavitz, Gregg)
December 19, 2011 Filing 127 DECLARATION of Andrew W. Stern in Support re: #109 MOTION For An Order Pursuant to Rule 72(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) re: #106 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9)(Stern, Andrew)
December 19, 2011 Filing 126 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #109 MOTION For An Order Pursuant to Rule 72(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) re: #106 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Stern, Andrew)
November 30, 2011 Filing 125 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Opposition re: #109 MOTION For An Order Pursuant to Rule 72(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) re: #106 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA)(Swartz, Justin)
November 30, 2011 Filing 124 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #109 MOTION For An Order Pursuant to Rule 72(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) re: #106 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
November 18, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/30/2011. (lmb)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Justin M. Swartz dated 11/18/2011 re: We write to respectfully request a 9-day extension of Plaintiffs' deadline to file their response to Defendant's Objections to Magistrate Judge Cott's October 7, 2011 Memorandum and Order from November 21, 2011 to November 30, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/18/2011) (lmb)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Deborah N. Misir, Grant M. Lally, and William G. Morris dated 11/8/2011 re: Counsel for Washington Legal Foundation and the International Association of Defense Counsel writes to submit a courtesy copy of their Notice of Motion for Leave to File a Brief as Amici Curiae in Support of Defendant's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Memorandum and Order Entered and Served on 10/11/2011 as well as a supporting declaration which attaches the proposed Amici brief. ENDORSEMENT: I don't need any ore answer briefs on this issue. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/10/2011) (ft)
November 8, 2011 Filing 121 DECLARATION of Deborah N. Misir in Support re: #120 MOTION to File Amicus Brief in Support of Defendant's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Memorandum and Order Entered and Served on October 11, 2011.. Document filed by International Association of Defense Counsel, Washington Legal Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief)(Misir, Deborah)
November 8, 2011 Filing 120 MOTION to File Amicus Brief in Support of Defendant's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Memorandum and Order Entered and Served on October 11, 2011. Document filed by Washington Legal Foundation, International Association of Defense Counsel.(Misir, Deborah)
November 8, 2011 Filing 119 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #109 MOTION For An Order Pursuant to Rule 72(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) re: #106 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,.. Document filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (Conway, George)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Justin M. Swartz dated 11/7/2011 re: Plaintiffs respectfully request that the Court deny the Motion of the U.S. Chamber of Commerce to file an Amicus Brief in Support of Defendant's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's October 11, 2011 Order. ENDORSEMENT: I am allowing it. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/8/2011) (rjm)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from George T. Conway III dated 11/7/2011 Re: We represent amicus curiae Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. Enclosed are courtesy copies of the Chamber's notice of motion for leave to file a brief in support of defendant's objections to Magistrate Judge Cott's October 11, 2011 order, and of a supporting declaration that attaches the Chamber's proposed brief. ENDORSEMENT: The motion is granted. The brief can be filed. Granting #115 Motion to File Amicus Brief. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/7/2011) (rjm) Modified on 11/15/2011 (rjm).
November 7, 2011 Filing 116 DECLARATION of George T. Conway III in Support re: #115 MOTION to File Amicus Brief in Support of Defendant's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's October 11, 2011 Order.. Document filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Proposed Amicus Brief))(Conway, George)
November 7, 2011 Filing 115 MOTION to File Amicus Brief in Support of Defendant's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's October 11, 2011 Order. Document filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America.(Conway, George)
November 4, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney George T Conway to RE-FILE Document #114 MOTION to File Amicus Brief in Support of Defendant's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's October 11, 2011 Order. ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Declaration in Support of Motion is found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
November 4, 2011 Filing 114 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to File Amicus Brief in Support of Defendant's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's October 11, 2011 Order. Document filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George T. Conway III, #2 Exhibit (Proposed Amicus Brief))(Conway, George) Modified on 11/7/2011 (ldi).
November 3, 2011 Filing 113 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Justin M. Swartz dated 11/02/2011 re: Counsel for the plaintiffs request a 10-day extension of time to 11/21/2011 to file a Response, Plaintiffs further respectfully request that the Court grant Defendant a 10-day extension of time to 12/9/2011 to file its Reply. ENDORSEMENT: OK. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (Responses due by 11/21/2011, Replies due by 12/9/2011.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/3/2011) (ft)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #94 MOTION AND ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF ERIC G. HOFFMAN, ESQ.: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/2/2011) (ab)
October 28, 2011 Filing 111 Objection re: #106 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Stern, Andrew)
October 28, 2011 Filing 110 DECLARATION of Andew W. Stern in Support re: #109 MOTION For An Order Pursuant to Rule 72(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) re: #106 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8 (Part 1 of 5), #9 Exhibit 8 (Part 2 of 5), #10 Exhibit 8 (Part 3 of 5), #11 Exhibit 8 (Part 4 of 5), #12 Exhibit 8 (Part 5 of 5))(Stern, Andrew)
October 28, 2011 Filing 109 MOTION For An Order Pursuant to Rule 72(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) re: #106 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(Stern, Andrew)
October 20, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #107 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 10/14/2011, Receipt Number 1019115. (jd)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #107 Motion for Susan H. Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby Ordered that Susan H. Stern is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for the plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/17/2011) (mro)
October 14, 2011 Filing 107 MOTION for Susan H. Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler.(wb) (pgu).
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the reasons set forth in this memorandum and order, KPMG's motion for a protective order is DENIED. This decision is without prejudice to KPMG renewing its application for a protective order-or negotiating with Plaintiffs as to a sample using keyword searches or otherwise-once Judge McMahon has resolved the Motion to Certify and the scope of Plaintiffs' representation is clarified, and as further set forth. Denying #90 Motion for Protective Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 10/7/11) Copies Sent By Chambers via ECF. (rjm)
September 15, 2011 Filing 105 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner on behalf of Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler (Wagoner, Elizabeth)
September 6, 2011 Filing 104 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 7/26/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 6, 2011 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 7/26/2011 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2011.(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 2, 2011 Filing 102 DECLARATION of ANDREW W. STERN in Support re: #90 MOTION for Protective Order.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 H, #9 I, #10 J, #11 K)(Stern, Andrew)
September 2, 2011 Filing 101 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Andrew W. Stern in Support re: #90 MOTION for Protective Order.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Stern, Andrew) Modified on 9/9/2011 (db).
September 2, 2011 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #90 MOTION for Protective Order. IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Stern, Andrew)
August 30, 2011 Filing 99 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a SETTLEMENT proceeding held on 6/16/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Moya, Goretti)
August 30, 2011 Filing 98 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: settlement held on 6/16/2011 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Joseph Quinones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/23/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/3/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2011.(Moya, Goretti)
August 26, 2011 Filing 97 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Opposition re: #90 MOTION for Protective Order.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)(Swartz, Justin)
August 26, 2011 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #90 MOTION for Protective Order.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
August 25, 2011 Filing 95 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dana Gale Sussman on behalf of Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler (Sussman, Dana)
August 17, 2011 Filing 94 MOTION for Eric G. Hoffman, to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(Kaplan, Alex)
August 12, 2011 Filing 93 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Stern, Andrew)
August 12, 2011 Filing 92 DECLARATION of Thomas Keegan in Support re: #90 MOTION for Protective Order.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Stern, Andrew)
August 12, 2011 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #90 MOTION for Protective Order.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Stern, Andrew)
August 12, 2011 Filing 90 MOTION for Protective Order. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(Stern, Andrew)
August 3, 2011 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alex Jason Kaplan on behalf of KPMG LLP (Kaplan, Alex)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: The parties shall have until August 2, 2011 to continue their meet and confer regarding a framework for the preservation of certain hard drives of KPMG's departing employees. The parties may contact the Court ex-parte or together if they require further assistance from the Court during this period. The parties shall advise the Court by letter on August 2, 2011 regarding the status of their discussions. If the parties are unable to reach an agreement on this issue, the brief schedule for Defendant's motion for a protective order is as follows: as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 8/12/2011., Responses due by 8/26/2011, Replies due by 9/2/2011.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 7/26/2011) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ama)
July 25, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Pre-Motion Conference held on 7/25/2011. (mro)
July 18, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Pre-Motion Conference set for 7/26/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (ft)
July 18, 2011 Filing 87 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re: #85 Endorsed Letter. Earlier today, the Court received a letter from Plaintiffs' counsel requesting an additional 10 days to allow the parties to continue to negotiate a protocol for the preservation of certain computer hard drives of departing KPMG employees who are potential FLSA opt-in plaintiffs and/or putative members of the New York class. The Court granted that request by memorandum endorsement. The Court has subsequently received a letter from counsel for KPMG "disagree[ing] with the Plaintiffs' suggestion... that the discussion of this issue should continue." Having carefully reviewed KPMG's detailed letter, I direct counsel to continue to negotiate between now and July 25, 2011. If the parties are unable to resolve this issue on their own, the parties shall appear at a pre-motion conference before the Court on Tuesday July 26,2011 at 11 a.m. in Courtroom 18A. If the parties are able to resolve this issue, they should so advise the Court promptly, and no later than July 25,2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 7/15/2011) (ft)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Justin M. Swartz dated 7/15/2011 re: Counsel for the Plaintiff writes to request an additional ten days to allow the parties to continue to negotiate. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 7/15/2011) (ab)
July 12, 2011 Filing 84 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 6/16/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 12, 2011 Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNCE held on 6/16/2011 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Joseph Quinones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/5/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2011.(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER SETTING HEARING: Defendant has unilaterally filed certain papers opposing plaintiffs' motion for conditional class certification under seal, claiming that they contain sensitive confidential and proprietary information about KPMG's business, including certain "unique and proprietary" audit policies, practices and procedures. The publicly-filed version of KPMG's brief in opposition to the motion and its supporting papers are heavily redacted. Plaintiff insists that KPMG has redacted information that cannot be considered "confidential" under any reasonable definition. By this order, I am directing the parties to recommend to the court independent experts in accounting who are not and never have been affiliated with or served as a consultant for KPMG or any affiliated or predecessor firm. From among their recommendations, I will appoint a court expert, who will review the allegedly proprietary practices and advise the court about whether they ought in fact to be subject to a confidentiality order. KPMG will bear the expense of the expert. I also intend to ask the AICPA and the SEC to weigh in on this issue if they are of a mind to do so. I have no wish to delay consideration of the conditional certification motion while we are organizing this hearing, so I am instructing plaintiff's counsel to file reply papers under seal. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/29/2011) (ab)
June 29, 2011 Filing 81 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Justin M. Swartz dated 6/28/2011 re: Counsel for the Plaintiffs writes to request a 10-day extension of their deadline to file their reply in support of conditional certification from 7/8/2011 to 7/18/2011. Defendants consent to this request. ENDORSEMENT: OK. (Replies due by 7/18/2011.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/28/2011) (ab)
June 28, 2011 Filing 80 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Collen McMahon from Andrew W. Stern dated 6/27/2011 re: Encosed herewith please find CDs containing electronic copies of KPMG's papers in both unredacted and redacted form. ENDORSEMENT: I no longer use CDs. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/28/2011) (jpo)
June 28, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen McMahon: Telephone Conference held on 6/28/2011. (Submitted by M. De Jesus). (mde)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Eric G. Hoffman dated 6/23/11 re: Counsel to defendant KPMG LLP informs the Court that KPMG intends to seek a protective order regarding Plaintiffs' premature service of merits discovery requests on or about may 24, 2011. Counsel requests either a conference before Your Honor on this issue or an order of reference to Magistrate Judge Cott. ENDORSEMENT: No need for a motion. Plaintiff's discovery requests are stricken. I said there would be no discovery until I deal with conditional certification. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/27/11) (djc)
June 24, 2011 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA. Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and Court-Authorized Notice. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service of Unredacted Versions of Opposition Papers)(Hoffman, Eric) (Main Document 78 replaced on 7/1/2013) (sdi).
June 24, 2011 Filing 77 DECLARATION of Eileen M. Walsh in Opposition re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-R (redacted in entirety))(Hoffman, Eric) (Main Document 77 replaced on 6/24/2013) (sdi). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2013: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit) (sdi).
June 24, 2011 Filing 76 DECLARATION of William W. Holder in Opposition re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D (part 1), #5 Exhibit D (part 2), #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F (part 1), #8 Exhibit F (part 2), #9 Exhibit F (part 3), #10 Exhibit F (part 4), #11 Exhibit F (part 5), #12 Exhibit F (part 6), #13 Exhibit F (part 7), #14 Exhibit F (part 8), #15 Exhibit F (part 9), #16 Exhibit G (part 1), #17 Exhibit G (part 2), #18 Exhibit G (part 3), #19 Exhibit G (part 4), #20 Exhibit G (part 5), #21 Exhibit H (part 1), #22 Exhibit H (part 2), #23 Exhibit H (part 3), #24 Exhibit H (part 4), #25 Exhibit H (part 5), #26 Exhibit H (part 6), #27 Exhibit H (part 7), #28 Exhibit H (part 8), #29 Exhibit I, #30 Exhibit J (part 1), #31 Exhibit J (part 2), #32 Exhibit J (part 3), #33 Exhibit J (part 4), #34 Exhibit K, #35 Exhibit L, #36 Exhibit M (part 1), #37 Exhibit M (part 2), #38 Exhibit M (part 3), #39 Exhibit M (part 4), #40 Exhibit N (part 1), #41 Exhibit N (part 2), #42 Exhibit N (part 3), #43 Exhibit N (part 4), #44 Exhibit N (part 5), #45 Exhibit N (part 6), #46 Exhibit N (part 7), #47 Exhibit O (part 1), #48 Exhibit O (part 2), #49 Exhibit O (part 3), #50 Exhibit O (part 4))(Hoffman, Eric) (Main Document 76 replaced on 6/14/2013) (sdi).
June 24, 2011 Filing 75 DECLARATION of David Butler in Opposition re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M (part 1), #14 Exhibit M (part 2), #15 Exhibit M (part 3), #16 Exhibit M (partt 4), #17 Exhibit M (part 5), #18 Exhibit M (part 6), #19 Exhibit M (part 7))(Hoffman, Eric)
June 24, 2011 Filing 74 DECLARATION of Jennifer Altfeld Landau, Esq. in Opposition re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Hoffman, Eric) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/24/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/24/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 4 replaced on 6/24/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 5 replaced on 6/24/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 6 replaced on 6/24/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 7 replaced on 6/24/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 8 replaced on 6/24/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 9 replaced on 6/24/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 10 replaced on 6/24/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 11 replaced on 6/24/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 12 replaced on 6/24/2013) (sdi). (Attachment 13 replaced on 6/24/2013) (sdi).
June 24, 2011 Filing 73 DECLARATION of Eric G. Hoffman, Esq. in Opposition re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-P (redacted in entirety), #2 Exhibit Q, #3 Exhibit R, #4 Exhibit S, #5 Exhibit T, #6 Exhibit U, #7 Exhibit V)(Hoffman, Eric) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/20/2013) (sdi). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2013: #8 Exhibit) (sdi). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2013: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit) (sdi).
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Eric G. Hoffman dated 6/22/11 re: counsel for defendant writes that, we wrote to the Court on June 17,2011, requesting permission to file a brief that exceeds the usual limit of 25 pages in connection with KPMG's opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and Court - Authorized Notice. KPMG. with Plaintiffs' consent, seeks 10 additional pages for its opposition and 10 additional pages for Plaintiffs' reply. As we have not seen any order from the Court on the docket, and given the amount of time remaining before KPMG's response is due, we wanted to remind the Court of the request. We await the Court's direction as to how we should proceed, and we apologize for the inconvenience of this additional correspondence. ENDORSEMENT: Yes - OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/22/11) (pl)
June 16, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Pre-Motion Conference held on 6/16/2011. (ft)
June 13, 2011 Filing 71 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding proceeding held on 5/25/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.(tro)
June 13, 2011 Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: proceeding held on 5/25/2011 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/8/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2011.(tro)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: The Court directs the parties to continue the meet and confer process until they either resolve the issue or reach an impasse. The parties should advise the Court by 6/10/2011 regarding the status of the negotiations and whether a conference is necessary, in which case the Court will schedule one as soon as its schedule permits. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 6/7/2011) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ab)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Justin M. Swartz dated 6/2/2011 re: Counsel for the Plaintiffs writes in response to Defendant's letter of 5/27/2011 and today, requesting that the Court issue a referral to Magistrate Judge Cott. Plaintiffs request that the Court order the parties to continue the meet and confer process until they resolve the issue or reach an impasse. ENDORSEMENT: I have already done the referral - you can suggest to Judge Cott that you may not need to see him. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/3/2011) (ab)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Justin M. Swartz dated 5/26/2011 re: Counsel for the Plaintiff writes to request that the Court extend the deposition deadline to 6/7/2011, in order to allow this last deposition to be completed. ENDORSEMENT: OK. (Deposition due by 6/7/2011.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/26/2011) (ab) Modified on 6/2/2011 (ab).
May 25, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Case Management Conference held on 5/25/2011. (mbe)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. The deposition of opt-in Plaintiff, Keeley Young, shall continue for whatever additional duration of time will allow Defendant to depose Ms. Young for a totality of one day of seven hours consistent with Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(d)(1). 2. The deposition shall occur in Omaha, Nebraska where Ms. Young resides, and the parties shall come to an agreement on the logistics of the deposition (i.e., whether the deposition will take place in person or by other remote means). 3. The scope of the deposition is not limited. The parties have represented that they plan to make an application to Judge McMahon requesting an extension of the deadline to conduct depositions related to conditional certification. If she grants that application, the parties agree that the deposition of Ms. Young will take place in person in Omaha on or before June 7, 2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 5/25/11) Copies Sent By Chambers via ECF. (rjm)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute: Discovery Dispute. Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Motions referred to James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/23/2011) (lnl)
May 20, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 05/11/2011, Receipt Number 6436. (jd)
May 19, 2011 Filing 64 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Eric G. Hoffman, dated 5/18/2011, re: We represent the defendant, KPMG LLP ("KPMG"), in the above-referenced action. Plaintiffs wrote to the Court on May 12, 20ll, with the consent of KPMG, requesting extensions of the deposition discovery and briefing schedules related to the pending motion for conditional certification. (A copy of Plaintiffs' letter is attached.) This Friday, May 20, 2011, is the presently-scheduled last day for KPMG to conduct depositions. KPMG respectfully requeststhat the Court grant Plaintiffs' May 12 request and that it rule prior to the deposition deadline so that KPMG can be assured of the opportunity to conduct the remaining depositions. ENDORSEMENT: Sorry - we never got (or lost) the earlier letter. OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/19/2011) (lnl)
May 17, 2011 Filing 63 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding proceeding held on 5/2/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(tro)
May 17, 2011 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: proceeding held on 5/2/2011 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/10/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2011.(tro)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION, granting #60 Motion for Wesley D. Felix to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for KPMG LLP. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/16/2011) (lnl)
May 16, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Telephone Conference held and completed on 5/16/2011 at 10:00 a.m. for a duration of 45 minutes. (js)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. Granting #57 Motion for Michael D. Warden to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/12/11) (rjm)
May 11, 2011 Filing 60 MOTION for Wesley D. Felix to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(sjo)
May 11, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 05/06/2011, Receipt Number 5969. (jd)
May 11, 2011 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary Frederick Bendinger on behalf of KPMG LLP (Bendinger, Gary)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER: The Lambert complaint shall be and hereby is dismissed without prejudice, effective on the date of this Order, as set forth in this stipulation and order. To the extent it is required, KPMG consents to Plaintiffs' request for leave to file the April 25, 2011 First Amended Complaint in Pippins and the First Amended Complaint shall be deemed to have been filed on April 25, 2011. KPMG's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Pippins First Amended Class Action Complaint shall be thirty (30) days after the Court's entry of an order on the pending conditional certification motion in Pippins (Docket #33). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/10/2011) (jpo)
May 6, 2011 Filing 57 MOTION for Michael D. Warden to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(tro)
May 2, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Case Management Conference held on 5/2/2011. (ab)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: As set forth at the conclusion of the conference held with the parties today, Defendant shall produce all documents that it might use at each of the upcoming expedited depositions of Plaintiffs no later than 36 hours before each deposition; however, whenever possible, Defendant shall provide such documents to Plaintiffs three days in advance of each deposition. For the reasons set forth at the conference, Plaintiffs' request seeking an order for Defendant to produce each Plaintiff's entire personnel file in advance of each Plaintiff's deposition is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 5/2/2011) (lnl)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Justin M. Swartz, dated 4/28/2011, re: We write on behalf of all parties in the above-referenced wage and hour class and collective action. We write to seek clarification and adjustment of the deadlines that the Court set with respect to the discovery that Defendant requested in order to respond to Plaintiffs' conditional certification motion. In order to accommodate deponents' travel schedules, counsel's travel to Seattle, and to avoid weekend depositions, the parties respectfully request that the deposition deadline be adjusted to May 20, 2011. With respect to document production, three of the five Plaintiffs and opt-ins have produced all documents responsive to Defendant's requests. Plaintiffs expect to be able to produce a few additional documents for the other two on or before April 29, 2011. Additionally, given these proposed adjustments, Plaintiffs propose that Defendant's opposition to Plaintiffs' conditional certification motion be due June 10, 20ll (extended from May 27, 2011) and Plaintiffs' reply be due June 24, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: Proposed dates agreed to by the parties in this letter are accepted by the Court. The discovery dispute is being referred to the Magistrate Judge. (Deposition due by 5/20/2011. Responses due by 6/10/2011. Replies due by 6/24/2011.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/28/2011) (lnl)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute: Discovery Dispute. Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Motions referred to James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/28/2011) (lnl)
April 27, 2011 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. KPMG LLP served on 4/27/2011, answer due 5/18/2011. Service was accepted by Lugo, Mail Clerk. Document filed by Kyle Pippins; Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
April 26, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 04/21/2011, Receipt Number 4815. (jd)
April 25, 2011 Filing 51 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against KPMG LLP with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Jamie Schindler, Kyle Pippins.(mbe) (rdz).
April 25, 2011 Filing 50 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler.(Swartz, Justin)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION, that granting #48 Motion for Steven T. Catlett to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for KPMG LLP in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/25/11) (pl) Modified on 4/25/2011 (pl).
April 21, 2011 Filing 48 MOTION for Steven T. Catlett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(mbe)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting #45 Motion for Jennifer Altfield Landau to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendant. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/21/11) (cd)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting #44 Motion for Michael C. Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendant. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/21/11) (cd)
April 20, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 04/08/2011, Receipt Number 3653. (jd)
April 15, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen McMahon: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/15/2011. Decision: Initial conference held. The Court granted certain of defendant's discovery requests in connection with the class certification motion. Defendants must take depositions of opt-in plaintiffs by April 30, 2011. Plaintiffs must provide defendant with all records plaintiffs submitted in connection with applications for CPA license as well as any documents submitted as part of applications for employment submitted by plaintiffs subsequent to their employment at KPMG by May 6, 2011. Defendants opposition papers must be filed by May 27, 2011 and reply papers are due June 10, 2011. The Court ordered that the Statute of Limitations for plaintif's claims would be tolled effective April 15, 2011. (Submitted by M. Jossen) (mde) .
April 13, 2011 Filing 43 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Andrew W. Stern dated 4/12/11 Re: We represent the defendant, KPMG LLP ("KPMG"), in the above-referenced action. KPMG desires to discuss with the Court at the upcoming conference on April 15, 2011, the schedule for Plaintiffs' recently-filed Motion for Conditional Certification and Court-Authorized Notice. ENDORSEMENT: I would of course grant the extension without condition - we will discuss all this on Friday. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/12/2011) (rjm) Modified on 4/13/2011 (rjm).
April 11, 2011 Filing 42 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Andrew W. Stern, dated 4/8/2011, re: We represent the defendant, KPMG LLP ("KPMG"), in the above-referenced action. Your Honor has scheduled an initial pretrial conference on Friday, April 15, 2011, at 11:45 a.m. I write to request the Court's permission for one or both of my partners, Michael Kelley and Jennifer Landau, who are in Los Angeles, to participate in the conference by telephone. My colleague, Eric Hoffman and I, will appear in-person, but I believe that the appearances of Mr. Kelley and Ms. Landau, whose pro hac vice applications have been filed today, will be helpful to the Court as well. ENDORSEMENT: Fine. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/11/2011) (lnl)
April 8, 2011 Filing 45 MOTION for Jennifer Altfield Landau to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(tro)
April 8, 2011 Filing 44 MOTION for Michael C. Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(mbe)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING MOTION LEAVE TO INTERVENE AS PREMATURE AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE: In short, at this moment it is far from apparent that this action will impede or impair the ability of the California plaintiffs to recover on their claims in a California court. I can see no reason to introduce new players (read, a new set of lawyers) in this court - especially for all purposes, as the movants wish -- until after we figure out what the scope of this action is going to be. Once we have sorted out the class issues, if there is any overlap between this action and the California action, plaintiffs may of course renew their motion for leave to intervene; nothing in this order precludes them from doing so. I imagine that KPMG will be writing to me shortly suggesting that this motion affords yet another basis for me to transfer this case to California (I denied a motion for reconsideration of that issue just yesterday). I might hope that this order would obviate the need for any such letter, but that would be wishful thinking indeed.. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/8/2011) (jpo)
April 7, 2011 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/15/2011 at 11:45 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (js)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMO ENDORSED ON NOTICE OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE MARCH 21, 2011 ORDER DENYING TRANSFER: ENDORSEMENT: The motion is denied. given the scope of the California action I do not consider the few piddling steps that were taken prior to the imposition of a multi-year stay, as described in the Landau Declaration to represent much of any prayers at all. The rest of defendant's arguments are mere regurgitation of points already made, considered and rejected. There is no need for any response from plaintiffs/see my individual rules. The motion is Denied. Conference on for 4/15/11 at 11:45 a.m.. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/7/2011) (js)
April 7, 2011 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Peter A. Muhic in Support re: #37 MOTION to Intervene Motion for Leave to Intervene for all Purposes Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a) or, in the alternative, Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b). MOTION to Intervene Motion for Leave to Intervene for all Purposes Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a) or, in the alternative, Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b).. Document filed by Leticia Facundo, Michelle Garcia, Norbert Mendonca, Szimonetta Petterman, Arlene Ridgeway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Muhic, Peter)
April 7, 2011 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #37 MOTION to Intervene Motion for Leave to Intervene for all Purposes Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a) or, in the alternative, Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b). MOTION to Intervene Motion for Leave to Intervene for all Purposes Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a) or, in the alternative, Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b).. Document filed by Leticia Facundo, Michelle Garcia, Norbert Mendonca, Szimonetta Petterman, Arlene Ridgeway. (Muhic, Peter)
April 7, 2011 Filing 37 MOTION to Intervene Motion for Leave to Intervene for all Purposes Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a) or, in the alternative, Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b). Document filed by Leticia Facundo, Michelle Garcia, Norbert Mendonca, Szimonetta Petterman, Arlene Ridgeway. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Muhic, Peter)
April 6, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Peter A. Muhic to RE-FILE Document #32 MOTION to Intervene Motion for Leave to Intervene for all Purposes Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a) or, in the alternative, Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b). MOTION to Intervene Motion for Leave to Intervene for all Purposes Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a) or, in the alternative, Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b). ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. (ldi)
April 6, 2011 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Support re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Swartz, Justin)
April 6, 2011 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
April 6, 2011 Filing 33 MOTION to Certify Class and Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler.(Swartz, Justin)
April 6, 2011 Filing 32 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Intervene Motion for Leave to Intervene for all Purposes Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a) or, in the alternative, Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b). Document filed by Leticia Facundo, Michelle Garcia, Norbert Mendonca, Szimonetta Petterman, Arlene Ridgeway. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Peter A Muhic and Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Muhic, Peter) Modified on 4/7/2011 (ldi).
April 6, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 03/24/2011, Receipt Number 933093. (jd)
April 4, 2011 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Jennifer Altfeld Landau, Esq. in Support re: #29 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #23 Order on Motion to Transfer Case.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Stern, Andrew)
April 4, 2011 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #23 Order on Motion to Transfer Case.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Stern, Andrew)
April 4, 2011 Filing 29 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #23 Order on Motion to Transfer Case. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(Stern, Andrew)
April 4, 2011 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(Stern, Andrew)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Hal B. Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/30/2011) (js)
March 30, 2011 Filing 26 RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM LOCAL RULE 6.3: The odds that I will change my mind and transfer this action to California are remote. A variety of factors caused me to conclude that the litigation should go forward here-at least through motions to dismiss, which I of Course anticipate will be forthcoming. I cannot imagine that the 'short reply brief" that KPMG asked to submit (which I said was unnecessary), would have changed my mind. If KPMG moves for reconsideration, it can submit a short statement of no more than three pages summarizing any developments in the California litigation of which the Court might not be aware (no more should be necessary, since the case docket sheet is publicly available). That is the variation from Local Rule 6.3 that I will permit. I will not permit any extension of the deadline for making any such motion. And plaintiffs need not file any response unless I direct otherwise (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/30/2011) Copies by ECF to all Counsel(js)
March 24, 2011 Filing 25 MOTION for Hal B. Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler.(mbe)
March 24, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth M. Marnin on behalf of Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler (Marnin, Seth)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER AND MOTION TO STAY THE ACTION: The Defendant's motion to transfer or, in the alternative, stay this action is denied. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/21/2011) (jpo)
March 8, 2011 Set Deadlines/Hearings: KPMG LLP answer due 4/4/2011. (djc)
March 8, 2011 Filing 22 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Andrew W. Stern dated 3/3/11 re: Counsel requests that KPMG's time to respond to the Complaint be extended from March 4, 2011 to April 4, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/7/11) (djc)
February 25, 2011 Filing 21 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Andrew W. Stern dated 2/25/2011 re: If the Court believes that a reply brief from KPMG would benefit its consideration of the Motion, KPMG respectfully requests such an opportunity. ENDORSEMENT: But I KNOW this stuff ! A brief would not be beneficial and would cost your client's money they don't need to spend. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/25/2011) (jpo) (js).
February 24, 2011 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Opposition re: #13 MOTION to Transfer Case Notice of Motion to Transfer or, in the Alternative, Stay This Action.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Swartz, Justin)
February 24, 2011 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #13 MOTION to Transfer Case Notice of Motion to Transfer or, in the Alternative, Stay This Action.. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Swartz, Justin)
February 22, 2011 Filing 18 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Justin M. Swartz dated 2/22/2011 re: Counsel respectfully request a brief extension of the deadline to file their opposition to defendant's motion to stay or transfer the case to 2/24/11. ENDORSEMENT: OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/22/2011) (jfe)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION, granting #6 Motion for Keith M. Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/16/2011) (lnl)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION, granting #5 Motion for Gregg I. Shavitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/16/2011) (lnl)
February 15, 2011 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Eric G. Hoffman, Esq. in Support re: #13 MOTION to Transfer Case Notice of Motion to Transfer or, in the Alternative, Stay This Action.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Hoffman, Eric)
February 15, 2011 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 MOTION to Transfer Case Notice of Motion to Transfer or, in the Alternative, Stay This Action.. Document filed by KPMG LLP. (Hoffman, Eric)
February 15, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case Notice of Motion to Transfer or, in the Alternative, Stay This Action. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(Hoffman, Eric)
February 10, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 02/04/2011, Receipt Number 928574. (jd)
February 9, 2011 Filing 12 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Andrew W. Stern, dated 2/9/2011, re: Counsel for the defendant, KPMG LLP, writes to request an extension of time to file a responsive pleadings from February 16, 2011 to March 4, 2011. Plaintiff's counsel consents to the proposed extension of time. ENDORSEMENT: You should confer with ME, because I assure you that if there is an identical action in California I will be transferring this one. So please set up a conference with me ASAP. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/9/2011) (lnl)
February 9, 2011 Filing 11 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler.(Bien, Rachel)
February 9, 2011 Filing 10 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler.(Bien, Rachel)
February 9, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric G. Hoffman on behalf of KPMG LLP (Hoffman, Eric)
February 9, 2011 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by KPMG LLP.(Stern, Andrew)
February 9, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew W. Stern on behalf of KPMG LLP (Stern, Andrew)
February 4, 2011 Filing 6 MOTION for Keith M. Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler.(mro)
February 4, 2011 Filing 5 MOTION for Gregg I. Shavitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler.(mro)
January 31, 2011 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. KPMG LLP served on 1/26/2011, answer due 2/16/2011. Service was accepted by Aixa Flores, Process Specialist. Document filed by Kyle Pippins; Jamie Schindler. (Bien, Rachel)
January 28, 2011 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order Scheduling an Initial Pretrial Conference served on General Counsel on 1/28/11. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler. (Bien, Rachel)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/15/2011 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/26/2011) (js)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/15/2011 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/26/2011) (jfe)
January 19, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (ama)
January 19, 2011 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. (ama)
January 19, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to KPMG LLP. (ama)
January 19, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KPMG LLP. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 926639)Document filed by Kyle Pippins, Jamie Schindler.(ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pippins et al v. KPMG LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Rehm
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Huang
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian J. Cogley
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Brimmell
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Burns
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Schindler
Represented By: Hal B. Anderson
Represented By: Adam T Klein
Represented By: Rachel Megan Bien
Represented By: Susan Hilary Stern
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Justin Mitchell Swartz
Represented By: Keith M. Stern
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Represented By: Seth M. Marnin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisha Brumbaugh
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Arthur
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas F. Lisnich
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Suet Wai So
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy DeLuca
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krysten M. Genaway
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Diane Towers
Represented By: Justin Mitchell Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Onyiah
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Ellen Davis
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William S. Lockard III
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Mattar
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Michael Gardner
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna R. Truex
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domenico Pontrelli
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ian Tarrant
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie T. Unkart
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jovan Tucker
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hays
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacie M. Onken
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orealis Marie Alvarado
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Kaufman
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Chen
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Lee
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalia Klimkowski
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Goldsand
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander J. Gilbertson
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Sabrina Williams
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary A. Schamaun
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela S. Lee
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Charles Robertson
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigh Anne Rozycki
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Edward Capstick
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett E. Kirkland
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill N. Minshew
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Ann Westenberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyangsoon Lee
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Tucker Mahar
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert G. Pyrz
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Thompson (Peter)
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey W. Barlam
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Martynov
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Bland
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myla N. Chatman
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bond N. Ferguson (Munson)
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy A. Hillenbrand
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Comendeiro
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zahra J. Castillo
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew S. Hanley
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin T. Maier
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly C. Conner
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Oscarson
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Yoo
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas D. Martine
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyson P. LeDesky
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Edelman
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Leung
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kate Pinney
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew D. Ytzen
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul W. Kemp
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley K. Jastrow
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke A. Ballance
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica R. Beckendorf
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ha
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle L. Mysuna
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Harris Rosen
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aiman M. Wahdan
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Grzenia
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Rodriguez
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory S. Torbic
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward A. Valentino
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Coriell
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yelena Glants
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin (Keun) W. Pak
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Sheynkman Gorin
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeShawd T. Thompson
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trisha Lewis Martin
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan A. Keele
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine L. Blaylock
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leif E. Bergquist
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Travis
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Pick
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Leigh Moore
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole M. Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carli Kisaba
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Brice Filus
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Dorey
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Cook
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen L. Juan
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachariah Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesaria Rutigliano
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell A. Melfi
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reuben Abitbol
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle L. Cahill
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca A. Krammen
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maile M. Lewis
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher D. Bushey
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savannah Lehman
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Joseph Van De leuv
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Howell
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wakana Kamesato Sebacher
Represented By: Rachel Megan Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Colacicco
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Koneman
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanyna M. Louis
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica A. Goode
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Gaul
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher A Marino
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terese V. Strehlow
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Shah
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Gill
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent E. Arnold
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Brenner
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan M. Swaner
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Bekas
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah R. Sims
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren M. Brown
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Jones
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Weichholz
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dosanna Wu
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katlin A. Mick
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas X. Yao
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Sullum
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda B. Kane
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jae Y. Chung
Represented By: Justin Mitchell Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine A. Sweet
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan J. Keys
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominica Barber
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hui Zhi
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara A. Lasek
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Moreland
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Hertz
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund Tong
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seville Nicole Christmas
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Rak
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine P. Somera
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard S. Seger III
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie M. Adams
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Yu
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Kimani
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Murphey
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Satomi Takahashi
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan E. Toms (Humber)
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Mills
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lela Mujakovic
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Boscola
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick A. Thompson
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin N. Beebe
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew T. Cox
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Zhuravleva
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole A. Serino
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla L. Barrett
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio D. Ramos
Represented By: Dana Gale Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth M. Simmons
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rongchen Chen
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Stokes
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard N. Tinelli
Represented By: Justin Mitchell Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen N. Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Jalette
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt |