Nunez v. N.Y.C. Department of Correction et al
Plaintiff: Mark Nunez
Defendant: Thomas, Primm, Johnson and City of New York
Case Number: 1:2011cv05845
Filed: August 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Bronx
Presiding Judge: Theodore H. Katz
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Ninth Report of the Nunez Independent Monitor. (Docket Entry No. 341.) The Ninth Report details issues that have developed which are of great concern to the Court, specifically those described in the sections titled "Efforts to Advance Reforms and Address areas of Concern" (id. at 5-9) and "Looking Ahead" as regards the treatment of 16 and 17-year-olds. (Id. at 258-259.) To ensure that the issues are addressed efficiently and expeditiously, the Court hereby directs the Monitoring Team to file a status report no later than July 2, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/17/2020) (ama)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Accordingly, I will adopt the plaintiffs' proposed discovery plan, set forth in Appendix A to the Letter of Vasudha Talla et al. dated February 5, 2014, with the following modifications as set forth herein. The defendants have requested an order compelling the plaintiffs to identify, ninety (90) days prior to the fact discovery deadline, all use of force incidents (other than those for which the names plaintiffs have sued) that the plaintiffs intend to rely on in thei r case-in-chief at trial. The plaintiffs propose to provide this information in connection with expert disclosures and the pretrial order. It is reasonable to require the plaintiffs to reveal the scope of their case prior to the close of fact discove ry so that the defendants will have an opportunity to seek information in connection with the incidents identified. It is not practical, however, for such a disclosure to be made 90 days in advance of the fact discovery deadline. Rather, the plaintiffs shall provide the requested disclosure prior to the commencement of Phase III of the discovery plan. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/18/2014)Copies Mailed By Chambers (djc) Modified on 2/19/2014 (djc).
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The plaintiffs and defendants' applications are granted in part and denied in part as indicated above. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 5/17/2013) (lmb)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, the agreed-upon class notice shall be posted in English and Spanish in areas of all law libraries, housing areas, and receiving rooms of each DOC jail where it is reasonably calculated to be seen by inmates in the area. In addition, DOC shall provide a copy of the notice to each inmate involved in a "Class A" Use of Force incident during the pendency of the action. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/28/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (lmb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez v. N.Y.C. Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?