Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas v. Richard Paniagua et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Dorothy Russell Shattuck, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al. and Law Debenture Trust Company of New York
Defendant: The Kraft Group, David C. De Sieyes, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, David C. De Sieyes, and United States Trust Compan, GBL Alpha Edge Common Trst FD & Trust Company, Daniel S. Gregory, Madge A. L. Macneil Trust, Local 134 Pension Plan No. 5 S&P 500 Fund, John Doe, as Trustee of Pension Reserves Investment Trust Fund, Investors Bank & Trust Co, John Doe, as trustee of JHT New Income Trust, Onebeacon Insurance Company, as Administrator of Onebeacon Insurance Pension Plan, Spindle Limited partnership Balanced Advisory, Margaret R. Coniglio, as Trustee of the Trust by Margaret R Coniglio u/a dtd, The Trust under an Agreement dated December 19, 1977 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley and United States Trust Company of New York, as Trustees, RE State St. Bank & Trust Co., John Doe as Owner of C. Boynton Index 500 Portfolio, David C De Sieyes, Cambridge Appleton Trust Co., Fiduciary Trust Company International, C. Boynton Index 500 Portfolio, JFH II Spectrum Income Fund, John Hancock Funds II (Equity-Income Fund), John Doe, as Owner of State Street Bank & Trust Co / IBT-Account # 2, John T Risley, Mill Shares Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd, F&C Management Limited, Pennsylvania General Insurance Co., Carr Total Return Fund Limited Partnership, State St. Bank & Trust Co., The Peoples Bank, Reed Elsevier, Hyde Park Savings Bank, John Doe, as Administrator of OneBeacon Insurance Savings Plan, Manulife Mutual, Marcia Tingley, Trustee U/A DTD by Edwin J. Hayes Jr., SA U.S. Market Fund, MB Financial Bank, N.A., Anne-Marie S Greenberg, Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, in its capacity as Trustee of the Trust for the benefit of C. Boynton u/a A. Johnson, Dorothy L. Drummey, as trustee of the Deld Family Foundation trust UAD, John Doe, as Administrator of Waterman Broadcasting Corp Employee Profit Sharing Plan u/a, UD VS Risley CJ DE Sieyes et al, Joshua F. Lombard, Natixis Funds Trust II, Harvard Management Co., William W. Howells, Madge A. L. Macneil, UD Virginia S. Risley JT Risley, State Street Bank & Trust Co., as successor to Investors Bank Trust Company, Jennifer Grumhaus Daly, Homeland Insurance Company of New York, JHF II Spectrum Income Fund, Harvard University, State Street Bank & Trust Co. as Successor to Investors Bank Trust Company/Institutional Custody, Rhumbline Advisers, I.B.E.W. 103, Bernard E & Edith B. Waterman Charitable Foundation, Local 143 S&P 500 Index Fund, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund, Walter K Taylor, The Trust by Margaret R. Coniglio u/a dtd, IBEW Local 103 Pension Plan, Pension Reserves Investment Trust Fund, Martha D. Donahue, Bernard E. Waterman and Edith B. Waterman, JTWROS, John Doe, as Administrator of Reed US Retirement Plan, The Trust for the benefit of C. Boynton u/a A. Johnson, President and Fellows of Harvard College, United States Trust Company of New York, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund, Anne E Taylor, LPL Financial, Deld Family Foundation Trust UAD, Shirley C. Beal Gegenheimer, John Doe, as Administrator of OneBeacon Insurance Pension Plan, DL Partners LP, Beverly Mackintosh, Northern Assurance Co. of America, Aloysius J Franz, Blue Hills Bank (f/k/a Hyde Park Savings Bank), Edwin J Hayes, Jr., Margaret R Coniglio, State Street Bank & Trust Co./IBT-Account #2, Karen Rapkin, Bernard E. Waterman and Edith B. Waterman, State Street Trust and Banking Co Ltd., State Street Bank & Trust Co., as Owner of IBT-Account # 2, Madge A. L. Macneil, as trustee of the madge A. L. Macneil trust, John T. Risley, as trustee of the trust under an agreement dated December 19, 1977 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley and United States Trust company of New York, as Trustee, Fiduciary Trust Company International, as Trustee of a Trust under an agreement dated December 19, 1977 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley and United States Trust Company of, John Doe, as Trustee of the Connell Family Partnership Trust, William H. Risley, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 19, 1977 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley and United States Trust Company of New York, as Trus, Walter E. Graham, Investors Bank and Trust Institutional Company, State Street Bank & Trust Company, Palmer & Dodge LLP, Manulife Mutual Funds, UD VS Risley DC De Sieyes et al., Putnam S&P 500 Fund, Richard Paniagua, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Marshfield Clinic Master Trust, The Trust Under an agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, adn William H. Risley, Charles Joseph De Sieyes and United States Trust Company of New York, as trustees, Fiduciary Trust Co., United States Trust Company of New York, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Viriginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, David C. De Sieyes, and Unit, Reed Elsevier Inc., Republic Bank and Trust Co., The Trust by Walter E. Graham u/a dtd, Pension Reserves Investment Management Board, as trustee of Pension Reserves Investment Trust Fund, GBL Alpha Edge Common Trust FD, The President and Fellows of Harvard College, Pension Reserves Investment Management Board, Beverly Mackintosh, as Trustee of the Trust u/a dtd by Mary Coniglio, John Hancock variable insurance trust (f/k/a John Hancock Trust (New Income Trust)), Vikram Parvataneni, John Doe, as Administrator of Ontario Pension Board, Managed Pension Funds Limited (MFS Funds (UK)), State Street AMR, MassMutual Premier Funds, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, John Doe, as Administrator of IBEW Local 103 Pension Plan, Edwin J. Hayes, as Trustee of the Trust by Edwin J. Hayes Jr. u/a dtd, Norman W. Mitchell, Waterman Broadcasting Corp Employee Profit Sharing Plan u/a, Everest Reinsurance (Bermuda) Ltd., Adage Capital Advisors Long, Reed Elsevier Inc., as Administrator of Reed Elsevier US Retirement Plan, Fidicuiary Trust Company International, as Trustee of a Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as Settlor, and William H. Risley, Charles Joseph De Sieyes and Uni, Loomis Sayles Credit Alpha Fund, The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee of the Bank of New York Mellon Decommissioning Collective Trust Investment Plan - DT Broad Market Stock Index Fund, Boston Trust & Investment Management Company, Palmer & Dodge, Massmutual Select Funds, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan, John Doe, as Trustee of Marshfield Clinic Master Trust, Reed Elsevier US Retirement Plan, MML Series Investment Fund II, State Street Bank & Trust Co. as Successor to Investors Bank Trust Company, JFH II Equity-Income Fund, Cambridge Appleton Trust National Association, Francis L. Coolidge, Putnam S&P 500 Index Fund, John Hancock Funds II (Spectrum Income Fund), Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Equity 401K, John Doe, as Administrator of OneBeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Equity 401K, John Doe, as Administrator of OneBeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Fully Managed, Beverly Mackintosh, as Trustee of the Trust u/a dtd by Mary Coniglio GSTT TE Trust, State Street Trust and Banking, Spindle Limited Partnership, The Trust by Edwin J. Hayes Jr. u/a dtd, Timothy R. Kennedy, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Fully Managed, John Doe, as trustee of IBEW Local 103 Trust Fund, Fiduciary Trust Company International as Trustee of A Trust under an agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, David C. De Sieyes and United Stat, Onebeacon America Insurance Co., Board of Trustees of the Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, as administrator of Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, Carr Total Return Fund, The Trust u/a dtd by Mary Coniglio GSTT TE Trust, William H. Risley, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as Settlor, and William H. Risley, David C. De Sieyes, and United States Trust Company, Edith B Waterman, Edwards, Angell, Palmer & Dodge as Successor to Palmer & Dodge, Kathy Kuzmich, Onebeacon Insurance Co., Connell Limited Partnership, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, Bernard E. Waterman, SA Funds-Investment Trust, Onebeacon Insurance Pension Plan, SSB-Trust Custody, State Street Bank & Trust, Johnson FBO C. Boynton, Bernard Waterman, SA U.S. Value Fund, JHF Equity-Income Fund, Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Charles Joseph De Sieyes, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, Charles Joseph De Sieyes and United States T, Connell Family Partnership Trust, FM Global, Putnam Fiduciary Trust Company, as Trustee of Putnam S&P 500 Index Fund, Claretian Missionaries Western Province Inc., State Street Global Advisors Fund, DT Board Market Stock Index Fund, State Street Global Advisors, Welch and Forbes LLC, MML Equity Income Fund, Reed US Retirement Plan, Trustees of Boston College, SSBT Omnibus Account, Trustee of the TRUST U/A/DTD by Margaret R. Coniglio Trust, Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Charles J De Sieyes, Adage Capital Partners LP, Bracebridge Capital LLC, Olifant Fund Ltd., MML Blend Fund, Rhumbline S. A. Free S&P Index, The Trust u/a dtd by Mary Coniglio, John Hancock Funds II, Manulife Asset Management (US) LLC, William H. Risley, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, Charles Joseph De Sieyes and United States Trust Co, John Doe, as administrator Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, Commercial Banking Client Rang, Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, John Hancock Variable Insurance Trust, Fifth Third Bank, John Doe, as Trustee of GBL Alpha Edge Common Trust Fund, Fiduciary Company Incorporated, Anne G. Taylor, as Trustee of the Trust by Walter E. Graham u/a dtd, State Street Bank & Trust Co., as Successor to Investors Bank Trust Company/Institutional Custody, DL Partners, LP, The Trust under an agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, David C. De Sieyes, and United States Trust Company of New York, as Trustees, Does 1-5000, Strongbow Ltd, Equiserve Exchange Agent Overage, Putnam Fiduciary Trust Company, Trustee, MML Series Investment Fund, George E Keeler, Michael C. Donahue, Putnam Fiduciary Trust Company, as Trustee of the Local 134 Pension Plan No. 5 S&P 500 Fund, Waterman Broadcasting Inc, Matsco Incorporated, Defendants' Executive Committee, Everest Re Group Ltd., John Doe, as Owner of SSBT Onmibus Account, State Street Equity 500 Index Portfolio, Edwin J Hayes, JHT New Income Trust, Trust U/AA, Frederick Goldstein, Trustee of the Trust U/A DTD By Mary Coniglio, Investors Bank & Trust, Ontario Pension Board, Trustee of the Trust U/A DTD by Walter K. Graham FBO Walter E. Graham, Fiduciary SSB and Employers' Fire Insurance Company
Not Yet Classified: Carol E Newman, Cassandra Trading Group LLC and Cutler Group, LP
Case Number: 1:2011cv09409
Filed: December 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332fr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 378 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [6047 in 12-cv-2652-DLC] MOTION for Nicholas M. Kelley to Withdraw as Attorney For Defendant W.L. Putnam Prize Fund. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Nicolas M. Kelley terminated. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/28/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(jca)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 377 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (7770 in 1:11-md-02296-DLC) Letter filed by Marc S. Kirschner. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Deposition due by 5/15/2020.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(jca)
February 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Richard J. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
February 7, 2019 Filing 376 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:11-cv-04522-DLC; granting (7746) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Evan Robert Schnittman terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-DLC. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/7/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al. (jca)
January 30, 2019 Filing 375 DECLARATION of Evan Schnittman in Support re: (296 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 233 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03753-DLC, 201 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 122 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 303 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 61 in 1:13-cv-03750-DLC, 6019 in 1:12-cv-02652-DLC, 159 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 405 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 259 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 7746 in 1:11-md-02296-DLC, 230 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 298 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 374 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03738-DLC, 121 in 1:12-cv-06055-DLC, 194 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 282 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 211 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 175 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03752-DLC, 259 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 166 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 342 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03747-DLC, 246 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03739-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-03737-DLC, 130 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 149 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 120 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 855 in 1:12-cv-00064-DLC, 286 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 678 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 134 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 66 in 1:13-cv-03744-DLC, 61 in 1:13-cv-03743-DLC, 897 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 114 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 208 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 61 in 1:13-cv-03741-DLC, 162 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03748-DLC, 141 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 225 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 120 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 63 in 1:13-cv-03742-DLC, 290 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03749-DLC, 220 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 63 in 1:13-cv-03746-DLC, 298 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 218 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 264 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 186 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03751-DLC, 159 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 129 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 465 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 261 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 163 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 140 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 190 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03745-DLC, 125 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 152 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 386 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03740-DLC, 187 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03736-DLC) MOTION for Evan Schnittman to Withdraw as Attorney for defendant St. Barnabas Hospital & Braker Memorial Home Employees Custody.. Document filed by ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL & BRAKER MEMORIAL HOME EMPLOYEES CUSTODY. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(Schnittman, Evan)
January 30, 2019 Filing 374 MOTION for Evan Schnittman to Withdraw as Attorney for defendant St. Barnabas Hospital & Braker Memorial Home Employees Custody. Document filed by ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL & BRAKER MEMORIAL HOME EMPLOYEES CUSTODY.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(Schnittman, Evan)
January 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Pretrial Conference held on 1/14/2019. (Court Reporter Kristen Carannante) Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(gr)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER: A pretrial conference is scheduled for January 14, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street. The Court has received requests from counsel to participate in the conference by telephone. Accordingly, it is herebyORDERED that any party wishing to be heard at the conference must appear in person. Parties wishing only to listen to the conference by telephone may do so by calling (888) 363-4749 and entering access code 7185839. Overflow seating will be available in Courtroom 12B. Parties may order a transcript of the conference by contacting Southern District Reporters. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(gr)
January 10, 2019 Filing 372 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan Robert Schnittman on behalf of ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL & BRAKER MEMORIAL HOME EMPLOYEES CUSTODY. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(Schnittman, Evan)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 371 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (5945 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 7649 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 370 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS) Notice of Substitution of Attorney filed by Onebeacon Insurance Company et al. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Alan Joseph Stone added. Attorney Jack Yoskowitz and Julia Claire Spivack terminated.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/7/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 1:12-cv-02652-RJS(anc) Modified on 11/9/2018 (anc).
November 7, 2018 Filing 370 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Jack Yoskowitz, New Attorney: Alan J. Stone, Address: Milbank Tweed Hadley & McCloy LLP, 28 Liberty Street, New York, New York, USA 10005, 212-530-5285. Document filed by Employers' Fire Insurance Company, Homeland Insurance Company of, Homeland Insurance Company of New York, Mill Shares Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd, Northern Assurance Co. of America, One Beacon America Insurance Company, OneBeacon 401(K) Savings Employee Stock Ownership Plan, OneBeacon Insurance, OneBeacon Pension Plan (f/k/a OneBeacon Insurance Pension Plan), Onebeacon America Insurance Co., Onebeacon Insurance Co., Onebeacon Insurance Company, as Administrator of Onebeacon Insurance Pension Plan, Onebeacon Insurance Pension Plan, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Equity 401K, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Fully Managed, Pennsylvania General Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 1:12-cv-02652-RJS(Stone, Alan)
October 24, 2018 Filing 369 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Stephen Leonard Ratner, New Attorney: Alan J. Stone, Address: Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP, 28 Liberty Street, New York, New York, USA 10005, 212-530-5285. Document filed by SG Americas Securities LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Stone, Alan)
September 25, 2018 Filing 368 MOTION for Matthew J. Latterner to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by The Bank of Nova Scotia.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Latterner, Matthew)
September 24, 2018 Filing 367 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Joseph Stone on behalf of The Bank of Nova Scotia. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Stone, Alan)
June 7, 2018 Filing 366 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Tom Van Arsdel, New Attorney: James Andrew Hinds, Jr. . Document filed by Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc. aka JC Clark Adaly Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Hinds, James)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 365 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (7367 in case 11-md-2296) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCES OF DAVID S. MORDKOFF AND REMOVAL FROM ELECTRONIC SERVICE LIST. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney David Steve Mordkoff terminated.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/24/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al. (ras) Modified on 4/25/2018 (ras).
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting (7265) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (363) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that D. Ross Martin is granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record in these actions and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. (Attorney D. Ross Martin terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-RJS; Attorney D. Ross Martin terminated in case 1:11-cv-09409-RJS.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/6/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09409-RJS. (ras) Modified on 3/9/2018 (ras).
March 5, 2018 Filing 363 MOTION for D. Ross Martin to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Harvard Management Co., President and Fellows of Harvard College.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09409-RJS(Martin, D.)
May 4, 2017 Filing 362 MOTION for Michael D. Ricciuti to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by State Street Equity 500 Index Portfolio.(Ricciuti, Michael)
August 1, 2016 Filing 361 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Del Guercio on behalf of Everest Reinsurance (Bermuda) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Del Guercio, Anthony)
August 1, 2016 Filing 360 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Del Guercio on behalf of Everest Re Group Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Del Guercio, Anthony)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 359 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (223 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 184 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 204 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 867 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 358 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS) Letter re: Withdrawal of Counsel, filed by Marc S. Kirschner. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney James Philip Chou; James Philip Chou; James Philip Chou; James Philip Chou and James Philip Chou terminated. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/25/2015) (kko)
August 25, 2015 Filing 358 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from David M. Zensky dated August 25, 2015 re: Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Zensky, David)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER in case 1:11-cv-04522-RJS; granting (6483) Letter Application to Change Attorney Name on Roll. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/6/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al. (ajs)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 356 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL Alexander R. Bilus for Defendants Board of Trustees of the Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, as administrator of Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan; JHF Equity-Income Fund; JFH II Equity-Income Fund; JFH II Spectrum Income Fund; JHT New Income Trust; John Hancock Funds II; John Hancock Funds II (Equity-Income Fund); John Hancock Funds II (Spectrum Income Fund); John Hancock Variable Insurance Trust (f/k/a John Hancock Trust (NewIncome Trust)); John Hancock Variable Insurance Trust; Manulife Asset Management (US) LLC; Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX; Manulife Mutual Funds; Manulife U.S. Equity Fund; MassMutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund; MassMutual Premier Funds; MassMutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund; MassMutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund; MassMutual Select Diversified Value Fund; MassMutual Select Funds; MassMutual Select Indexed Equity Fund; MML Blend Fund; MML Equity Income Fund; MML Series Investment Fund; and MML Series Investment Fund II. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/5/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09409-RJS(mro)
November 21, 2014 Filing 355 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Todd Steinberg on behalf of Board of Trustees of the Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, as administrator of Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, JFH II Equity-Income Fund, JFH II Spectrum Income Fund, JHF Equity-Income Fund, JHT New Income Trust, John Hancock Funds II, John Hancock Funds II (Equity-Income Fund), John Hancock Funds II (Spectrum Income Fund), John Hancock Variable Insurance Trust, John Hancock variable insurance trust (f/k/a John Hancock Trust (New Income Trust)), MML Blend Fund, MML Equity Income Fund, MML Series Investment Fund, MML Series Investment Fund II, Manulife Asset Management (US) LLC, Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Manulife Mutual Funds, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund, MassMutual Premier Funds, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Massmutual Select Funds, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09409-RJS(Steinberg, Stuart)
November 21, 2014 Filing 354 SUGGESTION OF DEATH upon the record as to Monica K. Hinman on June 27, 2013 . Document filed by Monika K HinmanFiled In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Martin, Brendon)
September 18, 2014 Filing 353 NOTICE of Submission of Letter. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust). (Attachments: #1 Attachment)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Zensky, David)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 352 SUPPLEMENTAL CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION ANDPROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/28/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(cd)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER: Named Defendants Counsel may make any or all of its eleven proposed motions to dismiss, so long as the initial briefs are limited to a combined 250 pages. These initial briefs shall be submitted no later than Friday, May 23, 2014. The response briefs shall also be limited to a combined 250 pages, and shall be submitted no later than Monday, June 23, 2014. The reply briefs, if any, shall be limited to a combined 100 pages, and shall be submitted no later than Thursday, July 3, 2014. Shareholder Liaison Counsel is directed to file its proposed global motion to dismiss Count 1 on behalf of all 5,200 Shareholder Defendants. The initial brief shall be submitted no later than Friday, May 23, 2014, and shall be no longer than 40 pages. The response brief shall be submitted no later than Monday, June 23, 2014, and shall be no longer than 40 pages. The reply brief, if any, shall be submitted no later than Thursday, July 3, 2014, and shall be no longer than 15 pages. ( Motions due by 5/23/2014. Responses due by 6/23/2014. Replies due by 7/3/2014.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/24/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(cd)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 350 PROTECTIVE ORDER IN AID OF MEDIATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... The Court shall retain jurisdiction to interpret and enforce this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/18/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(cd)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Scott Harshbarger dated 3/11/2014 re: Request to withdraw as counsel for defendant DT Broad Market Stock Index Fund. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/17/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09409-RJS(cd)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Scott Harshbarger dated 3/11/2014 re: Request for leave to withdraw as counsel for defendant, DT Broad Market Stock Index Fund, in the 11-cv-9409 case. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/14/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09409-RJS(cd)
March 7, 2014 Filing 347 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jennifer Lynn Zordani to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9431269. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cassandra Trading Group LLC, Cutler Group, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Motion)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Zordani, Jennifer) Modified on 3/7/2014 (wb).
February 28, 2014 Filing 346 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leland H. Chait on behalf of B H Gerald Rogers MD Ltd Employee Pension Trust U/A 07/01/84, B H Gerald Rogers, Trustee, Mary Sutliffe Loucks Trust Portfolio 835, Mary Sutliffe Loucks, Trustee, Ralph Loucks Trust, Ralph B Loucks, Trustee, Robert B Greene Jr Trust U/A 11/06/86, Robert B Greene Jr, Trustee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Chait, Leland)
February 28, 2014 Filing 345 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sabina Clorfeine on behalf of Sempra Energy Pension Master Trust, Sempra Energy, Trustee, Sempra Energy Pension Mstr Trst. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Clorfeine, Sabina)
February 28, 2014 Filing 344 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kurt E Wilson on behalf of Warren J. Eide. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Wilson, Kurt)
February 27, 2014 Filing 343 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sabina Clorfeine on behalf of SDG&E Nuc Facilities NQ CPUC Decom Master Trust For Songs, SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Clorfeine, Sabina)
February 27, 2014 Filing 342 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Thomas Boos on behalf of Okabena US Core Equity Fund, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Boos, Matthew) Modified on 3/10/2014 (lb).
February 27, 2014 Filing 341 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Thomas Boos on behalf of David R. Coggins, Jr. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Boos, Matthew) Modified on 3/10/2014 (lb).
February 13, 2014 Filing 340 MOTION for Richard J. Leamy, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9354696. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Claretian Missionaries Western Province Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Leamy, Richard)
February 5, 2014 Filing 339 MOTION for Brian E. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CATHOLIC UNITED INVESTMENT TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Martin, Brian)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER: Robert A. Skinner, is withdrawing as one of the attorneys of record for Welch & Forbes LLC in this matter. SO ORDERED. Attorney Robert A. Skinner terminated. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/7/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09409-RJS(tro)
December 10, 2013 Filing 337 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Eric David Madden on behalf of BLACK DIAMOND ARBITRAGE OFFSHORE LTD. F/K/A BLACK DIAMOND ARBITRAGE OFFSHORE LDC, Black Diamond Arbitrage Offshore LDC, Black Diamond Arbitrage Offshore Ltd., Black Diamond Offshore Ltd., Carlson Capital LP. New Address: Reid Collins & Tsai LLP, 1601 Elm Street, Ste. 4900, Dallas, Texas, USA 75201, 214-420-8900. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Madden, Eric)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER granting (2927) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Scott Cameron Kessenick is granted leave to withdraw from his representation of the above named Defendants in this action and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. Attorney Scott Cameron Kessenick terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-RJS (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/06/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09409-RJS (ama)
December 5, 2013 Filing 335 MOTION for Scott Cameron Kessenick to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Motion of Withdraw of Counsel. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, as administrator of Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, JFH II Equity-Income Fund, JFH II Spectrum Income Fund, JHT New Income Trust, John Hancock Funds II, John Hancock Funds II (Equity-Income Fund), John Hancock Funds II (Spectrum Income Fund), John Hancock Variable Insurance Trust, John Hancock variable insurance trust (f/k/a John Hancock Trust (New Income Trust)), MML Blend Fund, MML Equity Income Fund, MML Series Investment Fund, MML Series Investment Fund II, Manulife Asset Management (US) LLC, Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Manulife Mutual Funds, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund, MassMutual Premier Funds, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Massmutual Select Funds, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund, JHF Equity-Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09409-RJS(Doluisio, Michael)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MASTER CASE ORDER NO.4: For the purpose of facilitating the efficient administration of these cases, including the preparation of a protocol for the future consideration of additional pre-answer motions to dismiss ("Phase Two Motions"), I and the Court having received submissions from Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel and Defendants' Liaison Counsel (after consultation with their Executive Committees) previously designated herein, it is further set forth within this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(rsh)
November 19, 2013 Filing 333 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PRO SE. by Joseph F. Kun. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(sc)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Rachel Sims dated 10/15/2013 re: Accordingly, I respectfully request that I be removed from the Court's electronic filing notifications for this action. I have been informed by the court clerk that I am required to make this application by letter to the Court. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/17/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(ama)
October 9, 2013 Filing 331 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Douglas J. Smillie, New Attorney: Kevin Kennedy, Address: Blake Kirchner, Symonds Larson, Kennedy and Smith, 535 Griswold, Suite 1432, Detroit, Michigan, USA 48226, 313-961-7321. Document filed by Timothy R. Kennedy. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Smillie, Douglas)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 330 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Eugene J. Geekie, Jr. of the law firm of Freeborn & Peters LLP hereby enters its appearance as proposed counsel for defendants Charles T. Brumback, Kimberly C. Brumback and Brumback Family, LLC, replacing Jeffrey David Eaton, Susan P. Persichilli and Louis T. DeLucia, of the law firm of Schiff Hardin LLP, who hereby withdraw as counsel of record for the heretofore named Defendants and shall have no further responsibility in this matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/07/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(ama)
September 27, 2013 Filing 329 CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order dated September 23, 2013, the Court concludes that Section 546(e) does not preempt the Individual Creditors SLCFC claims, but that Section 362(a)(1) nonetheless deprives the Individual Creditors of standing to avoid the same transactions that the Committee is simultaneously suing to avoid; Defendants motion to dismiss is therefore granted; accordingly, the cases listed in Exhibit A of the Memorandum and Order dated September 23, 2013 and this judgment are closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/27/13) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(ml)
August 23, 2013 Filing 327 DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
August 23, 2013 Filing 326 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 325 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 324 DECLARATION of Jay Teitelbaum in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 323 DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 322 MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order), #2 Exhibit B (Schedule of Avoidance Actions))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 12, 2013 Filing 321 NOTICE of Letter. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
June 28, 2013 Filing 328 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the terms, conditions and limitations of a Settlement Agreement, dated November 26, 2012 between the parties, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Exchangeable Notes commonly referred to as the PHONES notes (collectively, the "Note Holder Plaintiffs") and Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust (the "Trustee," and together with the Note Holder Plaintiffs, the "Plaintiffs"), hereby give notice that they are dismissing the actions listed below with prejudice solely against the corresponding defendant listed below: Marc S. Kirschner, as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust v. Dennis J. Fitzsimons, et al., Case No. 12 cv 2652 (RJS), with respect to Count XIII only (Count One in the proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, which is attached as Exhibit 1 to the Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaints Under Rule 15, 11 MD 2296, [Docket No. 2565]) MD 2296, [Docket No. 2565]) MATSCO INCORPORATED; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, et al. v. Richard Paniagua, et al., Case No. 11-cv09409 (RJS), MATSCO INCORPORATED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/28/2013) (tro)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 320 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a Settlement Agreement, dated April 24, 2013 between the parties, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Exchangeable Notes commonly referred to as the PHONES notes (collectively, the "Note Holder Plaintiffs") and Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust (the "Trustee," and together with the Note Holder Plaintiffs, the "Plaintiffs"), hereby give notice that they are dismissing the actions listed below with prejudice solely against the corresponding defendant listed below: Marc S. Kirschner, as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust v. Dennis 1. Fitzsimons, et al., Case No. 12 cv 2652 (RJS), with respect to Count XIII only (Count One in the proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, which is attached as Exhibit 1 to the Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaints Under Rule 15, 11 MD 2296, [Docket No. 2565]) MONETARY AUTHORITY OF SINGAPORE. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, et al. v. Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc. C/OAdaly Investment Management Co., et al., Case No. 11-cv-04784 (RJS),MONETARY AUTHORITY OF SINGAPORE. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/28/2013) (ama) Modified on 7/10/2013 (ama).
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 319 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a Settlement Agreement, dated November 29, 2012 between the parties. hereby give notice that they are dismissing the actions listed below with prejudice solely against the corresponding defendant listed below: Marc S. Kirschner, as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust v. Dennis J. Fitzsimons,et. al., Case No. 12 cv 2652 (RJS), with respect to Count XIII only (Count One in the proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, which is attached as Exhibit 1 to the Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaints Under Rule 15, 11 MD 2296, (Docket No. 2565) THE LINCOLN FUND TAX ADVANTAGED LP. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, et. al. v. Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc. C/O Adaly Investment Management Co., et. al., Case No. 11-cv-04784 (RJS), THE LINCOLN FUND TAX ADVANTAGED LP. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/28/2013) (ama) Modified on 7/15/2013 (db).
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 318 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a Settlement Agreement, dated November 15, 2012 between the parties, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Exchangeable Notes commonly referred to as the PHONES notes (collectively, the "Note Holder Plaintiffs") and Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust (the "Trustee," and together with the Note Holder Plaintiffs, the "Plaintiffs"), hereby give notice that they are dismissing the actions listed below with prejudice solely against the corresponding defendant listed below: Marc S. Kirschner, as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust v. Dennis J. Fitzsimons, et al., Case No. 12 cv 2652 (RJS), with respect to Count XIll only (Count One in the proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, which is attached as Tab 1 to the Letter to Judge Sullivan dated May 17,2013 [11 MD 2296, Docket No. 2522)BOSTON PRIVATE BANK & TRUST IN ITS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE OF THE TRUST FOR THE BENEFIT OF C. BOYNTON U/AA. JOHNSON Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, et al. v. Richard Paniagua, et al., Case No. 11-cv09409 (RJS),BOSTON PRIVATE BANK & TRUST IN ITS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE OF THE TRUST FOR THE BENEFIT OF C. BOYNTON U/AA. JOHNSON. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/26/2013) (ama)
April 30, 2013 Filing 317 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by The Peoples Bank. (Fecteau, Jonah)
April 30, 2013 Filing 316 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Blue Hills Bank (f/k/a Hyde Park Savings Bank). (Fecteau, Jonah)
April 5, 2013 Filing 315 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan M. Tosi on behalf of State Street Equity 500 Index Portfolio (Tosi, Ryan)
April 5, 2013 Filing 314 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael D. Ricciuti on behalf of State Street Equity 500 Index Portfolio (Ricciuti, Michael)
April 1, 2013 Filing 313 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Adage Capital Partners LP served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; Carr Total Return Fund Limited Partnership served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; Deld Family Foundation Trust UAD 9/30/02 served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; JFH II Equity-Income Fund served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; JFH II Spectrum Income Fund served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; JHT New Income Trust served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; John Hancock Funds II served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; John Hancock Funds II (Equity-Income Fund) served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; John Hancock Funds II (Spectrum Income Fund) served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; John Hancock Variable Insurance Trust served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; John Hancock variable insurance trust (f/k/a John Hancock Trust (New Income Trust)) served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; Local 143 S&P 500 Index Fund served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; MML Series Investment Fund served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; MML Series Investment Fund II served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; MassMutual Premier Funds served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; Massmutual Select Funds served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; Putnam Fiduciary Trust Company, as Trustee of Putnam S&P 500 Index Fund served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; SA Funds-Investment Trust served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; SSBT Omnibus Account served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; State Street Equity 500 Index Portfolio served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; State Street Global Advisors served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; Carr Total Return Fund served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012. Document filed by Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
March 27, 2013 Filing 312 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Judge William H. Pauley, III is no longer assigned to the case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(sjo)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER APPROVING PROTOCOL GOVERNING RETENTION AND DISCOVERY OF DOCUMENTS HELD BY COURT-APPOINTED EXAMINER, KENNETH N. KLEE, ESQ. It is ORDERED as follows: The Protocol Governing Retention and Discovery of Documents Held by Court-Appointed Examiner, Kenneth N. Klee, Esq. attached hereto as Exhibit A is APPROVED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/15/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(rjm)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' THIRD OMNIBUS MOTION TO ENLARGE THE TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINTS: granting (323) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04522-WHP; granting (391) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04538-WHP; granting (765) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04784-WHP; granting (125) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04900-WHP; granting (69) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-05136-WHP; granting (2166) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP; granting (215) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09319-WHP; granting (170) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09406-WHP; granting (132) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09407-WHP; granting (291) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09409-WHP; granting (90) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09408-WHP; granting (139) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09410-WHP; granting (159) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09510-WHP; granting (147) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09511-WHP; granting (128) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09512-WHP; granting (164) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09514-WHP; granting (76) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09515-WHP; granting (232) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09568-WHP; granting (135) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09569-WHP; granting (202) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09570-WHP; granting (579) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09572-WHP; granting (196) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09592-WHP; granting (99) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09591-WHP; granting (132) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09589-WHP; granting (162) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09588-WHP; granting (220) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09590-WHP; granting (95) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09600-WHP; granting (76) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09599-WHP; granting (222) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09598-WHP; granting (111) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09597-WHP; granting (68) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09596-WHP; granting (197) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09595-WHP; granting (83) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09594-WHP; granting (155) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09593-WHP; granting (71) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09587-WHP; granting (259) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09586-WHP; granting (88) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09585-WHP; granting (108) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09581-WHP; granting (188) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09582-WHP; granting (126) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09584-WHP; granting (241) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09583-WHP; granting (239) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09571-WHP; granting (328) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00061-WHP; granting (228) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00063-WHP; granting (107) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00062-WHP; granting (223) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00065-WHP; granting (706) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00064-WHP; granting (109) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00549-WHP; granting (100) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00550-WHP; granting (165) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00551-WHP; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00552-WHP; granting (114) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00554-WHP; granting (185) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00555-WHP; granting (755) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-02652-WHP; granting (65) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-04539-WHP; granting (10) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-06055-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (82) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (52) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (52) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (25) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (80) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (13) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (112) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (191) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (110) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (359) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04538-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (446) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (81) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (148) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (111) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (200) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (40) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (80) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (122) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (178) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (42) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (183) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (57) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (18) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (181) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; grant
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 309 SCHEDULING ORDER: The oral argument scheduled for March 1, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. on the Phase One Motions to Dismiss and on the Tendering PHONES Holders' Motion to Intervene as Plaintiffs is adjourned to April 26, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. (Oral Argument set for 4/26/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III). (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(pl)
February 4, 2013 Filing 308 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (106 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 180 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 94 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 587 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 124 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 102 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 150 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 141 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 215 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 219 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 314 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 189 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 64 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 116 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 711 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 63 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 78 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 57 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 103 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 135 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 94 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 146 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 66 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 233 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 157 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 269 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 208 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 122 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 187 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 296 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 1670 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 104 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 218 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 542 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 369 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 206 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 101 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
February 4, 2013 Filing 307 DECLARATION of David C. Bohan in Support re: (106 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 180 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 94 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 587 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 124 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 102 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 150 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 141 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 215 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 219 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 314 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 189 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 64 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 116 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 711 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 63 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 78 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 57 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 103 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 135 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 94 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 146 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 66 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 233 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 157 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 269 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 208 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 122 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 187 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 296 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 1670 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 104 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 218 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 542 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 369 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 206 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 101 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
January 30, 2013 Filing 306 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MML Series Investment Fund, MML Series Investment Fund II, MassMutual Premier Funds, Massmutual Select Funds.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Doluisio, Michael)
January 30, 2013 Filing 305 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Doluisio on behalf of MML Series Investment Fund, MML Series Investment Fund II, MassMutual Premier Funds, Massmutual Select Funds Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Doluisio, Michael)
January 30, 2013 Filing 304 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Cameron Kessenick on behalf of MML Series Investment Fund, MML Series Investment Fund II, MassMutual Premier Funds, Massmutual Select Funds Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Kessenick, Scott)
January 30, 2013 Filing 303 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Bilus on behalf of MML Series Investment Fund, MML Series Investment Fund II, MassMutual Premier Funds, Massmutual Select Funds Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Bilus, Alexander)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 302 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court having received the attached letter request of Citadel Equity Fund Ltd., Camden Asset Management LP, and certain of their affiliates (collectively, the "Tendering PHONES Holders") to file a motion to intervene as plaintiffs in this multidistrict litigation, dated November 13,2012, the following briefing schedule is entered: As set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/29/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama)
January 24, 2013 Filing 301 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Dorothy L. Drummey, as trustee of the Deld Family Foundation trust UAD 9/30/02 served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012; Manulife Mutual Funds served on 12/10/2012, answer due 12/31/2012; Spindle Limited Partnership served on 12/13/2012, answer due 1/3/2013; Spindle Limited partnership Balanced Advisory served on 12/13/2012, answer due 1/3/2013; State Street Global Advisors Fund served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Doniak, Christine)
January 18, 2013 Filing 300 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Substitution of Party, Counsel, and Liaison Counsel [Docket No.2179], Notice of Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints [Docket No. 2166], Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion [Docket No.2170], Declaration of David Zensky [Docket No. 2167], Declaration of Jay Teitelbaum, Esq. [Docket No. 2168] and Declaration of James S. Green, Jr. [Docket No. 2169[ on 1/11/13. Service was made by ECF and Mail. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP; granting (272) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Mitchell Zensky; Mitchell Patrick Hurley and Deborah Jill Newman terminated in case 1:11-cv-09409-WHP; granting [] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Mitchell Zensky; Mitchell Patrick Hurley and Deborah Jill Newman terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/4/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(djc)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MEMO ENDORSEMENT ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD: #261 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ackerman respectfully submits that this substitution of counsel will not cause any delay in this case. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Added attorney Seth M. Kean for David C. De Sieyes, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, David C. De Sieyes, and United States Trust Compan,Seth M. Kean for Fidicuiary Trust Company International, as Trustee of a Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as Settlor, and William H. Risley, Charles Joseph De Sieyes and Uni,Seth M. Kean for Fiduciary Trust Company International as Trustee of A Trust under an agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, David C. De Sieyes and United Stat,Seth M. Kean for Fiduciary Trust Company International, as Trustee of a Trust under an agreement dated December 19, 1977 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley and United States Trust Company of,Seth M. Kean for John T. Risley, as trustee of the trust under an agreement dated December 19, 1977 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley and United States Trust company of New York, as Trustee,Seth M. Kean for UD VS Risley CJ DE Sieyes et al,Seth M. Kean for UD VS Risley DC De Sieyes et al.,Seth M. Kean for UD Virginia S. Risley JT Risley,Seth M. Kean for William H. Risley, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as Settlor, and William H. Risley, David C. De Sieyes, and United States Trust Company,Seth M. Kean for William H. Risley, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, Charles Joseph De Sieyes and United States Trust Co,Seth M. Kean for William H. Risley, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 19, 1977 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley and United States Trust Company of New York, as Trus. Attorney Wystan M. Ackerman terminated.(Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/4/2013) (djc)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER: The Court having considered the motion seeking leave, pursuant to Local Rule 1.4. for Kate O'Keeffe to withdraw as Counsel for the following named Defendants in the above referenced Action: Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX; Manulife U.S. Equity Fund; MassMutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund; MassMutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund; MassMutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund; MassMutual Select Diversified Value Fund; MassMutual Select Indexed Equity Fund; MML Blend Fund; and MML Equity Income Fund. And it appearing to the Court that the relief requested is appropriate, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Kate O'Keeffe is granted leave to withdraw from his representation of the above named Defendants in this action and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/4/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(js) Modified on 1/14/2013 (djc). Modified on 1/14/2013 (djc).
January 11, 2013 Filing 295 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 10 in 1:12-cv-06055-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Filing 294 DECLARATION of James S. Green, Jr. in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 10 in 1:12-cv-06055-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Filing 293 DECLARATION of Jay Teitelbaum in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 10 in 1:12-cv-06055-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Filing 292 DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Filing 291 MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order), #2 Exhibit B (Schedule of Avoidance Actions))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER: The Court having considered the motion seeking leave, pursuant to Local Rule 1.4. for Kate O'Keeffe to withdraw as Counsel for the following named Defendants in the above-referenced Action: Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX; Manulife U.S. Equity Food; MassMutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund;MassMutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Food; MassMutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Food; MassMutual Select Diversified Value Fund; MassMutual Select Indexed Equity Fund; MML Blend Fund; and MML Equity Income Food. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Kate O'Keeffe is granted leave to withdraw from his representation of the above named Defendants in this action and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/4/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(djc) Modified on 1/14/2013 (djc).
January 2, 2013 Filing 289 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Doluisio on behalf of JFH II Equity-Income Fund, JFH II Spectrum Income Fund, JHT New Income Trust, John Hancock Funds II, John Hancock Funds II (Equity-Income Fund), John Hancock Funds II (Spectrum Income Fund), John Hancock Variable Insurance Trust, John Hancock variable insurance trust (f/k/a John Hancock Trust (New Income Trust)) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Doluisio, Michael)
January 2, 2013 Filing 288 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Bilus on behalf of JFH II Equity-Income Fund, JFH II Spectrum Income Fund, JHT New Income Trust, John Hancock Funds II, John Hancock Funds II (Equity-Income Fund), John Hancock Funds II (Spectrum Income Fund), John Hancock Variable Insurance Trust, John Hancock variable insurance trust (f/k/a John Hancock Trust (New Income Trust)) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Bilus, Alexander)
January 2, 2013 Filing 287 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Cameron Kessenick on behalf of JFH II Equity-Income Fund, JFH II Spectrum Income Fund, JHT New Income Trust, John Hancock Funds II, John Hancock Funds II (Equity-Income Fund), John Hancock Funds II (Spectrum Income Fund), John Hancock Variable Insurance Trust, John Hancock variable insurance trust (f/k/a John Hancock Trust (New Income Trust)), JHF Equity-Income Fund, JHF II Spectrum Income Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Kessenick, Scott)
December 26, 2012 Filing 297 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Mike Eugene Abernethy, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(rdz)
December 21, 2012 Filing 286 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
December 11, 2012 Filing 285 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Adage Capital Partners LP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Momborquette, David)
December 11, 2012 Filing 284 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristie Marie Blase on behalf of Adage Capital Partners LP Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Blase, Kristie)
December 11, 2012 Filing 283 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Keith Momborquette on behalf of Adage Capital Partners LP Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Momborquette, David)
December 7, 2012 Filing 282 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan W. Young on behalf of jennifer grumhaus daly Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(Young, Jonathan)
December 7, 2012 Filing 281 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Joshua F. Lombard waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Reed Elsevier Inc. waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Reed Elsevier Inc., as Administrator of Reed Elsevier US Retirement Plan waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Reed Elsevier US Retirement Plan waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Rhumbline Advisers waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Doniak, Christine)
December 6, 2012 Filing 280 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell Jan Banas, Jr on behalf of Carol E Newman Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Banas, Mitchell)
December 5, 2012 Filing 279 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Martin, D.)
December 5, 2012 Filing 278 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by D. Ross Martin on behalf of President and Fellows of Harvard College Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Martin, D.)
December 4, 2012 Filing 277 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by DL Partners, LP.(D'Agostino, Michael)
December 4, 2012 Filing 276 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael C. D'Agostino on behalf of DL Partners, LP Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael)
December 3, 2012 Filing 275 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Adage Capital Advisors Long.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Momborquette, David)
November 13, 2012 Filing 274 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
November 9, 2012 Filing 273 DECLARATION of David M. Zensky in Support re: #272 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Limited Withdrawal and Limited Substitution of Counsel.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 9, 2012 Filing 272 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Limited Withdrawal and Limited Substitution of Counsel. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zensky, David)
November 6, 2012 Filing 271 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (i) Motion To Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6), And The Exhibit Thereto, And (ii) Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion, And The Exhibit Thereto on 11/6/2012. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
November 6, 2012 Filing 270 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
November 6, 2012 Filing 269 MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. Responses due by 12/21/2012 Return Date set for 3/1/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Steven R. Schoenfeld dated 10/24/2012 re: I request that the Court so order the substitution of Robinson & Cole LLP for Dorsey & Whitney LLP with respect to my role as a member of the Defendants' Executive Committees under Master Case Order No. 3. The enclosed notice of the submission of this letter requesting this change has been sent to all counsel via ECF filing in 12 MC 2296. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/26/2012). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al. Docket entry to be made in 12mc2296, 11md2296 and member cases as per Chambers. (rjm)
October 26, 2012 Filing 267 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Doluisio on behalf of Board of Trustees of the Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, as administrator of Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, Manulife Mutual Funds Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Doluisio, Michael)
October 26, 2012 Filing 266 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Cameron Kessenick on behalf of Board of Trustees of the Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, as administrator of Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, Manulife Mutual Funds Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Kessenick, Scott)
October 26, 2012 Filing 265 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Bilus on behalf of Board of Trustees of the Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, as administrator of Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, Manulife Mutual Funds, Manulife Mutual Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Bilus, Alexander)
October 22, 2012 Filing 264 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
October 16, 2012 Filing 263 PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), Plaintiffs hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against each of the defendants listed below (collectively, the "Dismissed Defendants"): Edwards, Angell, Palmer & Dodge as Successor to Palmer & Dodge; and Palmer & Dodge., Edwards, Angell, Palmer & Dodge as Successor to Palmer & Dodge terminated. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/15/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(lmb)
October 5, 2012 Filing 261 MOTION for Wystan M. Ackerman to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Charles J De Sieyes, David C De Sieyes, Fiduciary Trust Company International, John T Risley.(Ackerman, Wystan)
October 1, 2012 Filing 262 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #133 Amended Complaint against Adage Capital Advisors Long, Anne G. Taylor, as Trustee of the Trust by Walter E. Graham u/a dtd 10-16-2000, Bernard E & Edith B. Waterman Charitable Foundation, Bernard E. Waterman and Edith B. Waterman, Beverly Mackintosh, as Trustee of the Trust u/a dtd 8/22/1989 by Mary Coniglio, Beverly Mackintosh, as Trustee of the Trust u/a dtd 8/22/1989 by Mary Coniglio GSTT TE Trust, Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, in its capacity as Trustee of the Trust for the benefit of C. Boynton u/a A. Johnson, Boston Trust & Investment Management Company, Bracebridge Capital LLC, C. Boynton Index 500 Portfolio, Cambridge Appleton Trust Co., Cambridge Appleton Trust National Association, Charles Joseph De Sieyes, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, Charles Joseph De Sieyes and United States T, Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, Commercial Banking Client Rang, Connell Family Partnership Trust, Connell Limited Partnership, Francis L. Coolidge, DT Board Market Stock Index Fund, Jennifer Grumhaus Daly, David C. De Sieyes, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, David C. De Sieyes, and United States Trust Compan, Charles J De Sieyes, David C De Sieyes, Martha D. Donahue, Michael C. Donahue, Edwin J. Hayes, as Trustee of the Trust by Edwin J. Hayes Jr. u/a dtd 5/26/2006, Reed Elsevier, Employers' Fire Insurance Company, Equiserve Exchange Agent Overage, FM Global, Fiduciary Company Incorporated, Fiduciary SSB, Fiduciary Trust Co., Fifth Third Bank, Aloysius J Franz, GBL Alpha Edge Common Trst FD & Trust Company, GBL Alpha Edge Common Trust FD, Frederick Goldstein, Walter E. Graham, Anne-Marie S Greenberg, Harvard Management Co., Harvard University, Edwin J Hayes, Edwin J Hayes, Jr, Homeland Insurance Company of New York, I.B.E.W. 103, IBEW Local 103 Pension Plan, Investors Bank & Trust, John Doe as Owner of C. Boynton Index 500 Portfolio, John Doe, as Administrator of OneBeacon Insurance Savings Plan, John Doe, as Administrator of OneBeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Equity 401K, John Doe, as Administrator of OneBeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Fully Managed, John Doe, as Administrator of Ontario Pension Board, John Doe, as Administrator of Waterman Broadcasting Corp Employee Profit Sharing Plan u/a 01/01/7974, John Doe, as Owner of SSBT Onmibus Account, John Doe, as Owner of State Street Bank & Trust Co / IBT-Account # 2, John Doe, as Trustee of GBL Alpha Edge Common Trust Fund, John Doe, as Trustee of Marshfield Clinic Master Trust, John Doe, as Trustee of the Connell Family Partnership Trust, John Doe, as administrator Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, George E Keeler, Kathy Kuzmich, LPL Financial, Loomis Sayles Credit Alpha Fund, MML Blend Fund, MML Equity Income Fund, Beverly Mackintosh, Managed Pension Funds Limited (MFS Funds (UK)), Manulife Asset Management (US) LLC, Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund, Margaret R. Coniglio, as Trustee of the Trust by Margaret R Coniglio u/a dtd 08/22/1989, Marshfield Clinic Master Trust, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund, Matsco Incorporated, Mill Shares Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd, Olifant Fund Ltd., Onebeacon America Insurance Co., Onebeacon Insurance Co., Onebeacon Insurance Pension Plan, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Equity 401K, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Fully Managed, Ontario Pension Board, Richard Paniagua, Vikram Parvataneni, Pennsylvania General Insurance Co., Pension Reserves Investment Trust Fund, Putnam Fiduciary Trust Company, as Trustee of Putnam S&P 500 Index Fund, Putnam S&P 500 Index Fund, Karen Rapkin, Republic Bank and Trust Co., Rhumbline S. A. Free S&P Index, John T Risley, SA U.S. Market Fund, SA U.S. Value Fund, SSB-Trust Custody, SSBT Omnibus Account, Dorothy Russell Shattuck, State St. Bank & Trust Co., State Street AMR, State Street Bank & Trust, State Street Bank & Trust Co., as Owner of IBT-Account # 2, State Street Bank & Trust Co./IBT-Account #2, State Street Trust and Banking Co Ltd., Strongbow Ltd, Walter K Taylor, The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee of the Bank of New York Mellon Decommissioning Collective Trust Investment Plan - DT Broad Market Stock Index Fund, The Kraft Group, The Peoples Bank, The Trust by Edwin J. Hayes Jr. u/a dtd 5/26/2006, The Trust by Margaret R. Coniglio u/a dtd 08/22/1989, The Trust by Walter E. Graham u/a dtd 10-16-2000, The Trust for the benefit of C. Boynton u/a A. Johnson, The Trust u/a dtd 8/22/1989 by Mary Coniglio, The Trust u/a dtd 8/22/1989 by Mary Coniglio GSTT TE Trust, Marcia Tingley, Trustees of Boston College, UD VS Risley CJ DE Sieyes et al, UD VS Risley DC De Sieyes et al., UD Virginia S. Risley JT Risley, Bernard E. Waterman, Bernard Waterman, Edith B Waterman, Waterman Broadcasting Corp Employee Profit Sharing Plan u/a 01/01/1974, Welch and Forbes LLC, William H. Risley, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as Settlor, and William H. Risley, David C. De Sieyes, and United States Trust Company, William H. Risley, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, Charles Joseph De Sieyes and United States Trust Co, William H. Risley, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 19, 1977 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley and United States Trust Company of New York, as Trustee, Board of Trustees of the Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, as administrator of Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan The President and Fellows of Harvard College Blue Hills Bank (f/k/a Hyde Park Savings Bank) John Doe, as trustee of IBEW Local 103 Trust Fund,Added Party Manulife Mutual Funds Onebeacon Insurance Company, as Administrator of Onebeacon Insurance Pension Plan Pension Reserves Investment Management Board, as trustee of Pension Reserves Investment Trust Fund Putnam Fiduciary Trust Company, as Trustee of the Local 134 Pension Plan No. 5 S&P 500 Fund Local 134 Pension Plan No. 5 S&P 500 Fund Reed Elsevier Inc., as Administrator of Reed Elsevier US Retirement Plan Reed Elsevier US Retirement Plan,Added Party Reed Elsevier Inc. Rhumbline Advisers State Street Equity 500 Index Portfolio Fidicuiary Trust Company International, as Trustee of a Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as Settlor, and William H. Risley, Charles Joseph De Sieyes and United States Trust Company of New York, as Trustees Fiduciary Trust Company International as Trustee of A Trust under an agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, David C. De Sieyes and United States Trust Company of New York, as Trustees Fiduciary Trust Company International, as Trustee of a Trust under an agreement dated December 19, 1977 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley and United States Trust Company of New York, as Trustees The Trust under an agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, David C. De Sieyes, and United States Trust Company of New York, as Trustees United States Trust Company of New York, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Viriginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, David C. De Sieyes, and United States Trust Company of New York, as Trustees John T. Risley, as trustee of the trust under an agreement dated December 19, 1977 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley and United States Trust company of New York, as Trustees The Trust under an Agreement dated December 19, 1977 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley and United States Trust Company of New York, as Trustees The Trust Under an agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, adn William H. Risley, Charles Joseph De Sieyes and United States Trust Company of New York, as trustees Bernard E. Waterman and Edith B. Waterman Natixis Funds Trust II,Added Party Massmutual Select Funds,Added Party MML Series Investment Fund II Adage Capital Partners LP,Added Party SA Funds-Investment Trust State Street Bank & Trust Co., as Successor to Investors Bank Trust Company/Institutional Custody State Street Bank & Trust Co., as successor to Investors Bank Trust Company Carr Total Return Fund Limited Partnership Pension Reserves Investment Management Board Shirley C. Beal Gegenheimer,Added Party John Hancock Funds II (Equity-Income Fund) JHF Equity-Income Fund John Hancock Funds II John Hancock Funds II (Spectrum Income Fund) JHF II Spectrum Income Fund,Added Party JHT New Income Trust John Doe, as trustee of JHT New Income Trust John Hancock variable insurance trust (f/k/a John Hancock Trust (New Income Trust)) John Hancock Variable Insurance Trust Local 143 S&P 500 Index Fund DL Partners LP,Added Party Deld Family Foundation Trust UAD 9/30/02 Dorothy L. Drummey, as trustee of the Deld Family Foundation trust UAD 9/30/02 Madge A. L. Macneil Trust Madge A. L. Macneil, as trustee of the madge A. L. Macneil trust Spindle Limited partnership Balanced Advisory Spindle Limited Partnership,Added Party State Street Global Advisors State Street Global Advisors State Street Global Advisors Fund Madge A. L. Macneil,Added Party Daniel S. Gregory William W. Howells,Added Party Joshua F. Lombard Norman W. Mitchell Does 1-5000 . Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Related document: #133 Amended Complaint filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. ***Also docketed in case number 11-MD-2296, document
October 1, 2012 Filing 260 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
September 28, 2012 Filing 259 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth M. Kean on behalf of Charles J De Sieyes, David C De Sieyes, Fiduciary Trust Company International, John T Risley Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Kean, Seth)
September 27, 2012 Filing 258 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the PHONES notes, hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against defendant F&C Management Limited, who has neither moved nor answered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 9/27/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(lmb)
September 13, 2012 Filing 257 NOTICE of Notice of Filing and Service re: (1395 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1395 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, (1419 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James)
September 13, 2012 Filing 256 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Pleadings Relating to Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints re: (1370 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), (1364 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time For Service of Summonses and Complaints., (1367 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1366 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1365 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, (1368 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James)
September 10, 2012 Filing 255 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Kate O'Keefe, New Attorney: Michael S. Doluisio, Alexander R. Bilas, Scott C. Kessenick, Address: Dechert LLP, 2929 Arch Street, Philadelphia, PA, 19104, 215-994-4000. Document filed by MML Blend Fund, MML Equity Income Fund, Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund, MML Equity Index Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Doluisio, Michael)
September 4, 2012 Filing 254 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard M. Carbonara on behalf of Ruanwil LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Carbonara, Richard)
September 4, 2012 Filing 253 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard M. Carbonara on behalf of Stanton R. Cook Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Carbonara, Richard)
August 31, 2012 Filing 252 NOTICE of Notice of Filing and Service of Pleading re: (1364 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time For Service of Summonses and Complaints., (1367 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1366 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1365 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, (1368 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James)
August 30, 2012 Filing 251 MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time For Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James)
July 25, 2012 Filing 250 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Michael Ahron on behalf of DT Board Market Stock Index Fund (Ahron, Stephen)
July 25, 2012 Filing 249 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Steve Mordkoff on behalf of DT Board Market Stock Index Fund (Mordkoff, David)
July 25, 2012 Filing 248 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Leonard Ratner on behalf of DT Board Market Stock Index Fund (Ratner, Stephen)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 247 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial case management conference having been conducted on July 10, 2012, the following schedule is entered on consent:1. Defendants in the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company, et al v. FitzSimons, et al., 12 Civ 2652 (WHP) (the "Committee Action") are directed to submit a proposed organizational structure comprised of an executive committee of counsel who will fairly represent each group of defendants in this multi district litigation whose interests are similarly aligned. See Manual for Complex Litig., 10.221 (4th ed. 2004). The proposed organizational structure will be subject to this Court's approval and should be docketed on 12 MD 2296 by August 3, 2012. This Court appoints Grippo & Elden LLC to act as interim liaison counsel for defendants in the Committee Action.2.If defendants in the Committee Action cannot agree on a proposed organizational structure, competing applications for executive committees should be docketed on 12 MC 2296 and all related actions and submitted to chambers no later than August 3, 2012.3. Interim liaison counsel are directed to submit a proposed Master Case Order No. 3 consistent with this Court's directives by August 7, 2012. Where the parties cannot agree, they should submit alternative proposals for the Court's consideration. If necessary, the parties are permitted to submit letter memoranda in support of their respective positions. 4.Plaintiffs are directed to submit a letter memorandum outlining the limited discovery they now wish to pursue by July 26, 2012. Defendants shall submit a letter memorandum in response by August 16, 2012 5.This multi district litigation and all consolidated actions remain stayed in all other respects. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/11/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(js)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL:PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the law firm of Entwistle & Cappucci LLP hereby enters its appearance as proposed counsel for defendant Denise Meck, and G. Douglas Kilday and the law firm of Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody hereby withdraw as counsel of record for Denise Meck and shall have no further responsibility in this matter. Denise Meck hereby requests that all pleadings, notices, orders, and other papers given or filed in the above-captioned matter be given and served upon the following person at the address, telephone number, and e- mail address indicated in this order., Attorney G Douglas Kilday terminated. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lmb)
June 8, 2012 Filing 245 MOTION for William K. Dodds to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by MML Blend Fund, MML Equity Income Fund, Manulife Asset Management (US) LLC, Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund.(Dodds, William)
June 5, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 7/10/2012 at 11:30 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III. Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lmb)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MASTER CASE ORDER No. 2: The Clerk of the Court (the "Clerk") is directed to transfer docket entry ECF No. 692 (Order Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer Order) from 11 MD 2296 to the master case file bearing docket number 12 MC 2296 and number it ECF No. 18 on 12 MC 2296. The Clerk is directed to docket this Master Case Order No. 2 as ECF No. 19 on 12 MC 2296, and docket it on 11 MD 2296 and on all of the consolidated actions. Interim Lead Plaintiffs: The Clerk is directed to add the following plaintiff to the master case file: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company on behalf of Tribune Company, et al. (the "Unsecured Creditors Committee"). Accordingly, the docket sheet of 12 MC 2296 should list only the following plaintiffs: (i) Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (ii) Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (iii) Wilmington Trust Company, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the Phones Notes, (iv) William A. Niese, on behalf of a Putative Class of Tribune Company Retirees, and (v) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company on behalf of Tribune Company, et al. Interim Liaison Counsel for the Unsecured Creditors Committee: This Court appoints Zuckerman Spaeder LLP ("Zuckerman Spaeder") as interim liaison counsel for the Unsecured Creditors Committee and as further set forth in this order. All pending motions for substitution of counsel are granted. Notwithstanding the stay, parties may make motions to substitute counsel, and all such motions shall be docketed only on 11 MD 2296 and the relevant related actions and shall include a proposed order. Any party submitting a motion for substitution of counsel is directed to send a courtesy copy of the proposed order to chambers. No defendant has opposed Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' motion is granted. The time under Fed R. Civ. P. 4(m) for Plaintiffs to serve all summonses and complaints (as they have been or may be amended from time to time, subject to and in accordance with Fed R. Civ. P. 15 and 21) in all actions, and the time period referenced in Fed R. Civ. P. 15(c)(1)(C), is enlarged through and including August 31, 2012, retroactive to March 29, 2012. With respect to defendants who may be added as defendants or changed through amendments in any action on or after March 29, 2012, including defendants within the putative defendant classes who Plaintiffs determine should be individually named, the time under Fed R. Civ. P. 4(m) for Plaintiffs to serve the summonses and complaints (as they have been or may be amended from time to time, subject to and in accordance with Fed R. Civ. P. 15 and 21), and the time period referenced in Fed R. Civ. P. 15(c)(1)(C), shall expire no earlier than August 31, 2012. This Court will hold an initial pretrial conference with all interim liaison counsel on July 10, 2012 at 11:30 a.m. to discuss, inter alia, Defendants' co-interim liaison counsel's proposed organizational structure, a preliminary case management schedule, including a schedule for any motions to dismiss, the continuance of the stay, and any other issues counsel wish to raise. Notwithstanding Bankruptcy Judge Kevin J. Carey's Order Partially Lifting Stay of Adversary Proceedings and State Law Fraudulent Conveyance Actions, dated March 15, 2012, this multidistrict litigation and all consolidated actions remain stayed in all other respects. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lmb)
May 23, 2012 Filing 243 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jose Guillermo Sepulveda on behalf of TradeStation Securities, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Sepulveda, Jose)
May 7, 2012 Filing 242 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Kraft Group.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Solomont, Charles)
May 4, 2012 Filing 241 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Lorin Solomont on behalf of The Kraft Group Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Solomont, Charles)
April 24, 2012 Filing 240 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Master Trust Bank of Japan LTD. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Stone, Alan)
April 24, 2012 Filing 238 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company, as trustee of Christiana Care Health Services Retirement Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 24, 2012 Filing 237 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee of Self-Insurance Reserve Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 24, 2012 Filing 236 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee of Self-Insurance Reserve Fund, Wilmington Trust Company, as trustee of Christiana Care Health Services Retirement Plan Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 19, 2012 Filing 235 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Christiana Care Health Services Investment Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 19, 2012 Filing 234 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Christiana Care Unrestricted Investment Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 18, 2012 Filing 239 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine M Genaitis on behalf of Rhumbline S. A. Free S&P Index Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(mro)***Accepted for filing by the Honorable William H. Pauley on 4/18/12
April 18, 2012 Filing 233 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Hyde Park Savings Bank served on 12/12/2011, answer due 1/3/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Doniak, Christine)
April 17, 2012 Filing 232 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Doluisio on behalf of MML Blend Fund, MML Equity Income Fund, Manulife Asset Management (US) LLC, Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund (Doluisio, Michael)
April 17, 2012 Filing 231 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Christiana Care Health Services Investment Fund, Christiana Care Unrestricted Investment Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 16, 2012 Filing 230 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael A. Collora on behalf of Rhumbline S. A. Free S&P Index (Collora, Michael)
April 16, 2012 Filing 229 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine M Genaitis on behalf of Rhumbline S. A. Free S&P Index (Genaitis, Christine)
April 13, 2012 Filing 228 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Cameron Kessenick on behalf of Clearwater Growth Fund, John Hancock Financial Services Inc., VFTC-Vanguard Company Stock Markey Account 21, MML Equity Income Fund, T. Rowe Price Retirement Plan Services, Inc., Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Frank Russell Investments, Frank Russell Trust, Frank Russell, Russell Equity I Fund, Russell Investment Company, Russell Investment Company Diversified Equity Fund, Russell Investment Group, Russell Investments, Russell US Core Equity Fund, HARBOR CAPITAL GROUP TRUST, HARBOR MID CAP VALUE FUND, Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc., Linda Molenda, OptionsXpress, Inc., SBL FUND SERIES H, MML Blend Fund, MML Equity Income Fund, Manulife Asset Management (US) LLC, Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd, Charles Swab & Co., Inc., Aegon/Transamerica Series Fund - TRP, Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Vanguard Asset Allocation Fund, Inc., Vanguard Balanced Index Fund, Inc., Vanguard Equity Income Fund, Inc., Vanguard Fenway Funds, Vanguard Fiduciary Trust Company, Vanguard Group Inc., Vanguard Group Ltd., Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Institutional Index Fund, Vanguard Malvern Funds, Vanguard Quantitative Funds, Vanguard Valley Forge Funds, Vanguard Whitehall Funds, Vanguard World Fund, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd./Non-Flip Account C/O Amida Capital Management, LLC, Caxton Associates LP, Clearwater Investment, Walker House SPV Ltd., Caxton Associates LLC, Oppenheimer Main Street Select Fund, Oppenheimer Main Street Small & Mid-Cap Fund, Oppenheimer Variable Account Funds, OppenheimerFunds, Inc., Pro Shares UItra S&P 500, Rydex Investments, Rydex Series Funds Multi-Hedge Strategies Fund, Rydex Series Funds S&P 500 Pure Value Fund, Rydex Variable S&P 500 Pure Value Fund, Rydex Variable Trust Multi-Hedge Strategies Fund, Security Global Investors-Rydex/SGI, Charles Schwab Inv Mgt Co, Monumental Life Insurance Co, The Vanguard Group Inc, Vanguard Financial Group Inc, Vanguard Group Inc, Caxton International Limited, Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Kessenick, Scott)
April 13, 2012 Filing 227 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Bilus on behalf of Clearwater Growth Fund, John Hancock Financial Services Inc., VFTC-Vanguard Company Stock Markey Account 21, MML Equity Income Fund, T. Rowe Price Retirement Plan Services, Inc., Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Frank Russell Investments, Frank Russell Trust, Frank Russell, Russell Equity I Fund, Russell Investment Company, Russell Investment Company Diversified Equity Fund, Russell Investment Group, Russell Investments, Russell US Core Equity Fund, HARBOR CAPITAL GROUP TRUST, HARBOR MID CAP VALUE FUND, Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc., Kathleen Maloney, OptionsXpress, Inc., SBL FUND SERIES H, MML Blend Fund, MML Equity Income Fund, Manulife Asset Management (US) LLC, Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd, Charles Swab & Co., Inc., Aegon/Transamerica Series Fund - TRP, Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Vanguard Asset Allocation Fund, Inc., Vanguard Balanced Index Fund, Inc., Vanguard Equity Income Fund, Inc., Vanguard Fenway Funds, Vanguard Fiduciary Trust Company, Vanguard Group Inc., Vanguard Group Ltd., Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Institutional Index Fund, Vanguard Malvern Funds, Vanguard Quantitative Funds, Vanguard Valley Forge Funds, Vanguard Whitehall Funds, Vanguard World Fund, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd./Non-Flip Account C/O Amida Capital Management, LLC, Caxton Associates LP, Clearwater Investment, Walker House SPV Ltd., Caxton Associates LLC, Oppenheimer Main Street Select Fund, Oppenheimer Main Street Small & Mid-Cap Fund, Oppenheimer Variable Account Funds, OppenheimerFunds, Inc., Pro Shares UItra S&P 500, Rydex Investments, Rydex Series Funds Multi-Hedge Strategies Fund, Rydex Series Funds S&P 500 Pure Value Fund, Rydex Variable S&P 500 Pure Value Fund, Rydex Variable Trust Multi-Hedge Strategies Fund, Charles Schwab Inv Mgt Co, Monumental Life Insurance Co, Vanguard Financial Group Inc, Vanguard Group Inc, Caxton International Limited, Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Monumental Life Insurance Company, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bilus, Alexander)
April 4, 2012 Filing 226 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Ainsley G. Moloney, New Attorney: Michael C. D'Agostino. Document filed by Putnam Fiduciary Trust Company, Trustee, Putnam S&P 500 Index Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael)
April 4, 2012 Filing 225 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary C. Dunn on behalf of Dorothy Russell Shattuck Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Dunn, Mary)
March 30, 2012 Filing 224 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent F&C Asset Management plc for F&C Management Limited, F&C Management Limited, Managed Pension Funds Limited (MFS Funds (UK), Managed Pension Funds Limited (MFS Funds (UK). Document filed by F&C Management Limited, Managed Pension Funds Limited (MFS Funds (UK).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael) Modified on 4/18/2012 (ldi). Modified on 4/27/2012 (ldi).
March 30, 2012 Filing 223 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael C. D'Agostino on behalf of F&C Management Limited, Managed Pension Funds Limited (MFS Funds (UK) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael)
March 30, 2012 Filing 222 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan waiver sent on 7/5/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Lack, Robert)
March 30, 2012 Filing 221 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Fully Managed waiver sent on 7/5/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Lack, Robert)
March 30, 2012 Filing 220 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Equity 401K waiver sent on 7/5/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Lack, Robert)
March 30, 2012 Filing 219 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Onebeacon Insurance Pension Plan waiver sent on 7/5/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Lack, Robert)
March 30, 2012 Filing 218 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Onebeacon Insurance Co. waiver sent on 7/5/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Lack, Robert)
March 30, 2012 Filing 217 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Onebeacon America Insurance Co. waiver sent on 7/5/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Lack, Robert)
March 30, 2012 Filing 216 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, served. John Doe, as Administrator of OneBeacon Insurance Savings Plan served on 12/13/2011, answer due 1/3/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Lack, Robert)
March 30, 2012 Filing 215 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, served. John Doe, as Administrator of OneBeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Fully Managed served on 12/13/2011, answer due 1/3/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Lack, Robert)
March 30, 2012 Filing 214 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, served. John Doe, as Administrator of OneBeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Equity 401K served on 12/13/2011, answer due 1/3/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Lack, Robert)
March 30, 2012 Filing 213 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, served. John Doe, as Administrator of OneBeacon Insurance Pension Plan served on 12/13/2011, answer due 1/3/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Lack, Robert)
March 29, 2012 Filing 212 DECLARATION of Jay Teitelbaum in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 211 DECLARATION of Andrew N. Goldfarb in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 210 DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 209 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 208 MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 207 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Charles Bohan on behalf of Vincent A Badali, The Spurgeon Family Limited Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David) Modified on 4/4/2012 (ldi).
March 7, 2012 Filing 206 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Court Order dated February 14, 2012 on 2/15/12. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
March 5, 2012 Filing 205 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy D. Roy on behalf of Welch and Forbes LLC (Roy, Amy)
March 5, 2012 Filing 204 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert A. Skinner on behalf of Welch and Forbes LLC (Skinner, Robert)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MASTER CASE ORDER No. 1: In the exercise of its informed discretion, this Court restructures this multidistrict litigation as follows: The Clerk is directed to open a master case file bearing docket number 12 MC 2296. Any filing fees associated with opening the master case file docket are waived. The Clerk is directed to transfer the following docket entries from 11 MD 2296 to 12 MC 2296: ECF Nos. 1 (Transfer Order), 17 (Master Stay Order), 39 (Pilot Project Removal Order), 41 (Protective Order No.1), 62 (Pro Hac Order), 386 (Status Letter Order), 499 (Notice of Case Reassignment), and 559 (Temporary Stay Order). Those docket entries are to be numbered ECF Nos. 1-8, respectively, on 12 MC 2296. This Order shall be docketed as ECF No. 9 in 12 MC 2296 and docketed on all matters consolidated in 11 MD 2296. This Order and all subsequent docket entries on 12 MC 2296 are to be docketed simultaneously on 11 MD 2296. In addition, each subsequent filing by the parties on 12 MC 2296 or 11 MD 2296 shall indicate whether the filing should be docketed in all related actions or only in specified related actions. Counsel are reminded that filings are to be spread across all related actions only when necessary. Papers filed inappropriately will be stricken from the docket. Interim Lead Plaintiffs: The Clerk is further directed to list on the docket sheet of 12 MC 2296 only the following plaintiffs: (i) Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (ii) Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (iii) Wilmington Trust Company, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the Phones Notes, and (iv) William A. Niese, on behalf of a Putative Class of Tribune Company Retirees. Plaintiffs (i)-(iii) collectively are hereafter referred to as the "Note Holders" and plaintiff (iv) is referred to as the "Retirees." Interim Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs: This Court appoints Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP ("Akin Gump") as interim liaison counsel for the Note Holders and Teitelbaum & Baskin, LLP (the "Teitelbaum Firm") as interim liaison counsel for the Retirees. All counsel for plaintiffs are directed to confer for the purpose of identifying who among them intend to submit motion papers or memoranda to this Court, appear in person for conferences, or offer oral arguments to the Court. Plaintiffs are directed to submit a list to the Court identifying such counsel by March 30, 2012. Interim Lead Defendants: Based on a preliminary review of the complaints in the related actions, this Court endeavored to select interim lead defendants with a sufficient financial interest and who represent different classes of shareholders. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to list on the docket sheet of 12 MC 2296 only the following defendants: The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, on behalf of A Putative Class of Former Tribune Company Shareholders, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated, on behalf of A Putative Class of Former Tribune Company Shareholders, and Mario J. Gabelli, on behalf of A Putative Class of Former Tribune Company Shareholders. This Court appoints Proskauer Rose LLP (for The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation), Kaye Scholer, LLP (for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated), and Entwistle & Cappucci LLP (for Mario J. Gabelli) to act as interim co-liaison counsel for defendants. These firms are collectively referred to as "defendants' interim co-liaison counsel." Defendants are directed to submit a proposed organizational structure comprised of an executive committee of counsel who will fairly represent each group of defendants in this multidistrict litigation whose interests are similarly aligned. The proposed organizational structure will be subject to this Court's approval and should be docketed on 12 MD 2296 by April 20, 2012; as further set forth in this Master Case Order No. 1. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/23/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(mro)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER: The stay entered in this multi district litigation on December 28, 2012 by Judge Richard J. Holwell (ECF No. 17), and modified by Order dated January 27, 2012 (ECF No. 386), is further modified as follows: No party to this action is permitted to make any motion, file any documents on the docket, or submit any papers to the Clerk's Office or this Court's chambers until further notice from this Court. It is further ordered that all pending motions for admission pro hac vice are denied without prejudice. The Clerk ofthe Court is directed to terminate all pending motions for admission pro hac vice. This Court will establish a procedure for attorneys to appear in this action by subsequent order. Plaintiffs are directed to serve this Order on all Defendants forthwith. This order relates to all pro hac vice motions filed by attorneys in 11-MD-2296 and all related cases, denying (243) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (244) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (245) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (253) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (151) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04522-WHP; denying (320) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04538-WHP; denying (501) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04784-WHP; denying (81) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (159) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (184) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (185) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (189) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (190) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (191) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (194) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (196) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (203) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (204) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (206) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (217) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (218) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (219) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (222) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (234) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (237) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (258) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (259) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (266) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (267) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (269) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (276) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (279) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (282) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (309) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (311) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (312) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (328) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (332) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (334) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (353) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (354) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (356) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (359) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (361) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (362) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (364) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (402) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (405) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (408) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (423) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (440) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (445) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (471) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (474) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (479) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (500) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (501) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (503) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (504) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (505) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (506) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (507) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (508) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (510) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (512) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (513) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (514) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (515) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (516) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (517) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (525) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (527) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (533) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (534) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (536) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (539) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (541) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (543) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (548) Motion for Leave to Appear ; denying (552) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (553) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (554) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (555) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (556) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP; denying (167) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (193) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (201) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09409-WHP; denying (75) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (76) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09410-WHP; denying (344) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (346) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (352) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (364) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (369) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (370) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09572-WHP; denying (126) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09592-WHP; denying (85) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09589-WHP; denying (178) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (179) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (180) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09590-WHP; denying (55) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09597-WHP; denying (108) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09595-WHP; denying (100) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (101) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09593-WHP; denying (140) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (151) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (152) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (153) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09586-WHP; denying (137) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09583-WHP; denying (212) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00061-WHP; denying (160) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (161) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (162) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00063-WHP; denying (430) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (431) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00064-WHP; denying (65) Motion for Leave to Appear in case 1:12-cv-00549-WHP; denying (47) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00554-WHP. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/14/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(ft)
February 10, 2012 Filing 200 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Reed Elsevier Group plc, Corporate Parent Reed Elsevier NV, Corporate Parent Reed Elsevier U.S. Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Reed Elsevier Overseas B.V., Corporate Parent Reed Elsevier U.S. Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Reed Elsevier Group, PLC for Reed Elsevier, Reed Elsevier. Document filed by Reed Elsevier, Reed Elsevier.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Ratner, Stephen)
February 10, 2012 Filing 199 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Reed US Retirement Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Ratner, Stephen)
February 10, 2012 Filing 198 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carl Clyde Forbes on behalf of Reed Elsevier, John Doe, as Administrator of Reed US Retirement Plan, Reed US Retirement Plan, Reed Elsevier Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Forbes, Carl)
February 10, 2012 Filing 197 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Steve Mordkoff on behalf of Reed Elsevier, John Doe, as Administrator of Reed US Retirement Plan, Reed US Retirement Plan, Reed Elsevier Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Mordkoff, David)
February 10, 2012 Filing 196 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harry Frischer on behalf of Reed Elsevier, John Doe, as Administrator of Reed US Retirement Plan, Reed US Retirement Plan, Reed Elsevier Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Frischer, Harry)
February 10, 2012 Filing 195 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Leonard Ratner on behalf of Reed Elsevier, John Doe, as Administrator of Reed US Retirement Plan, Reed US Retirement Plan, Reed Elsevier Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(Ratner, Stephen)
February 10, 2012 Filing 194 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TradeStation Group, Other Affiliate Monex Group, Inc. for TradeStation Securities, Inc.. Document filed by TradeStation Securities, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Jackson, Richard)
February 9, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Richard Bryan Jackson to RE-FILE Document (97 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 60 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 54 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 106 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 62 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 120 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 81 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 138 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 62 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 141 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 191 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 442 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 21 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 34 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 210 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 192 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 148 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 44 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 58 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 123 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 120 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 99 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 54 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 87 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 33 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 55 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 45 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 109 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 175 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 375 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 104 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 53 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 144 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 116 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 169 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 107 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 91 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 497 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 36 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 599 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 51 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were only added to 11-md-2296. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). NOTE: YOU MUST SELECT THE FILER FOR EACH INDIVIDUAL CASE Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lb)
February 9, 2012 Filing 192 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge William H. Pauley, III. Judge Richard J. Holwell is no longer assigned to the case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(sjo)
February 9, 2012 Filing 191 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TradeStation Group, Other Affiliate Monex Group, Inc. for TradeStation Securities, Inc.. Document filed by TradeStation Securities, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Jackson, Richard) Modified on 2/10/2012 (lb).
February 8, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Anthony C. Valiulis to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document No. [488 (in 11-md-2296, and all consolidated actions)] Motion Pro Hac Vice. This document is not filed via ECF. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(db)
February 8, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Shawn M. Staples to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document No. [487 (11-md-2296, and all consolidated actions)] Motion Pro Hac Vice. This document is not filed via ECF. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(db)
February 8, 2012 Filing 190 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION of Anthony C. Valiulis for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Valiulis, Anthony) Modified on 2/9/2012 (db).
February 8, 2012 Filing 189 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION of Shawn M. Staples for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Staples, Shawn) Modified on 2/9/2012 (db).
February 3, 2012 Filing 188 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank J Morales on behalf of Automotive Machinists Pension Trust Fund, MICHAEL HENDRICKSON, Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry, Michael Parmalee Welfare and Pension Administration Inc Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Morales, Frank)
February 2, 2012 Filing 187 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent MB Financial, Inc. for MB Financial Bank, N.A.. Document filed by MB Financial Bank, N.A..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Dahl, James)
January 31, 2012 Filing 193 MOTION for Jennifer E. Greaney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, in its capacity as Trustee of the Trust for the benefit of C. Boynton u/a A. Johnson.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(pgu)
January 30, 2012 Filing 201 MOTION for Don M. Kennedy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Republic Bank and Trust Co.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09409-WHP(pgu)
January 30, 2012 Filing 186 ANSWER to #133 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Boston Trust & Investment Management Company.(Kennedy, Don)
January 30, 2012 Filing 185 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Republic Bancorp, Inc. for Republic Bank and Trust Co.. Document filed by Republic Bank and Trust Co..(Kennedy, Don)
January 30, 2012 Filing 184 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BTIM Corp. for Boston Trust & Investment Management Company. Document filed by Boston Trust & Investment Management Company.(Kennedy, Don)
January 30, 2012 Filing 183 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian J Hurst on behalf of Southwest Securities Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Hurst, Brian)
January 27, 2012 Filing 182 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent President and Fellows of Harvard College for Harvard Management Co.. Document filed by Harvard Management Co..(Martin, D.)
January 27, 2012 Filing 181 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by D. Ross Martin on behalf of Harvard Management Co. (Martin, D.)
January 27, 2012 Filing 180 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meghan E George on behalf of Southwest Securities Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(George, Meghan)
January 27, 2012 Filing 179 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Kennedy Dodds on behalf of MML Blend Fund, MML Equity Income Fund, Manulife Asset Management (US) LLC, Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund (Dodds, William)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (256) Motion for Marc C. Laredo to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-md-02296-RJH; granting (172) Motion for Marc C. Laredo to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09409-RJH. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09409-RJH(djc)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (257) Motion for Trevor M. Findlen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-md-02296-RJH; granting (173) Motion for Trevor M. Findlen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09409-RJH. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09409-RJH(djc)
January 27, 2012 Filing 176 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristie Marie Blase on behalf of Adage Capital Advisors Long Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09409-RJH(Blase, Kristie)
January 27, 2012 Filing 175 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Keith Momborquette on behalf of Adage Capital Advisors Long Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09409-RJH(Momborquette, David)
January 27, 2012 Filing 174 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ontario Pension Board.(Samson, Paul)
January 27, 2012 Filing 171 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Franklin Resources, Inc. for Fiduciary Trust Company International. Document filed by Fiduciary Trust Company International.(Ackerman, Wystan)
January 27, 2012 Filing 170 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc C. Laredo on behalf of Fiduciary Company Incorporated (Laredo, Marc)
January 27, 2012 Filing 169 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fiduciary Company Incorporated.(Findlen, Trevor)
January 27, 2012 Filing 168 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Trevor Michael Findlen on behalf of Fiduciary Company Incorporated (Findlen, Trevor)
January 26, 2012 Filing 173 MOTION for Trevor M. Findlen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Fiduciary Company Incorporated, Fiduciary Trust Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09409-RJH(pgu)
January 26, 2012 Filing 172 MOTION for Marc C. Laredo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Fiduciary Company Incorporated, Fiduciary Trust Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09409-RJH(pgu)
January 26, 2012 Filing 166 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wystan M. Ackerman on behalf of Fiduciary Trust Company International (Ackerman, Wystan)
January 26, 2012 Filing 165 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wystan M. Ackerman on behalf of Fiduciary Company Incorporated, Fiduciary Trust Company International (Ackerman, Wystan)
January 25, 2012 Filing 164 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Strongbow Ltd.(Carroll, Robert)
January 25, 2012 Filing 163 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent SVZ, LLC for Bracebridge Capital LLC. Document filed by Bracebridge Capital LLC.(Carroll, Robert)
January 25, 2012 Filing 162 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ABIL, Ltd. for Olifant Fund Ltd.. Document filed by Olifant Fund Ltd..(Carroll, Robert)
January 25, 2012 Filing 161 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Donald Carroll on behalf of Bracebridge Capital LLC, Olifant Fund Ltd., Strongbow Ltd (Carroll, Robert)
January 25, 2012 Filing 160 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ice Bear Incorporated.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Haider, Shan)
January 25, 2012 Filing 159 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Sherman Samson on behalf of Ontario Pension Board (Samson, Paul)
January 19, 2012 Filing 167 MOTION for Stephen C. Reilly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, in its capacity as Trustee of the Trust for the benefit of C. Boynton u/a A. Johnson.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09409-RJH(bwa)
January 19, 2012 Filing 158 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for the Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09409-RJH, 1:11-cv-09586-RJH, 1:11-cv-09591-RJH(Lack, Robert)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER REGARDING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION: All attorneys appearing in these cases must be admitted to practice in this court in accordance with Local Civil Rule 1.3. Attorneys seeking admission pro hac vice should follow the Court's instructions at http:www.nysd.uscourts.gov/pro_hac.php with the following exceptions: 1) Service of the motion on all parties is not required. 2) An admission fee is not required. 3) An ECF password may be obtained before pro hac vice admission is granted. Where the online application requires an admission date, applicants may use the date on which they first entered their appearance in the case. For assistance with the ECF tiling system, or with applying for admission pro hac vice, counsel may contact the Court's ECF Help Desk at 212-805-0800. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/12/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(mro)
January 6, 2012 Filing 156 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Steven Fischler on behalf of LPL Financial Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09409-RJH(Fischler, Robert)
January 4, 2012 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: (135 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJH) Order, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(lmb)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER: The court wishes to facilitate the filing of documents under seal in all cases that are, or will be, consolidated in this matter, in which a protective order was previously entered. Accordingly, the court hereby adopts in each such case any protective order which was in effect at the time of transfer. The court will provide a supplemental order identifying the adopted protective orders by docket number once all case dockets have been fully transferred to this court. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(lmb)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER: Pursuant to Standing Order M10-468, many of the cases in the above- captioned multidistrict litigation have been automatically designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the "Pilot Project"). However, because this court has stayed nearly all discovery and motion practice in these cases (see Order of December 28,2011 (the "Stay")), inclusion in the Pilot Project would be inappropriate. The court hereby designates that these cases shall not be included in the Pilot Project at this time. The court will revisit inclusion upon further order from this court or from the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware lifting the Stay. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(lmb)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER: Accordingly, the court hereby STAYS these consolidated cases, as well as any future cases consolidated under this docket number, pending further order of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware or this court. The times stayed include, but arc not limited to, any deadline for a defendant to respond to a complaint or to commence motion practice, and any period for objection or reply to a filed motion. The stay does not bar, but instead permits plaintiffs to (a) move for leave to further amend a complaint: (b) voluntarily dismiss an action or one or more defendants pursuant to Federal Rule of Ci vil Procedure 41; or (c) move to add or drop a party or to sever any claim against a party pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21. The stay does not bar defendants from objecting to any such motion by plaintiffs. The stay does not bar any party from moving the court to vacate or modify this order, or from responding to such a motion. The stay does not bar counsel from moving the court for admission pro hac vice. The court hereby waives the fee requirement for such motions. Notwithstanding this stay, all defendants or their counsel who have not already appeared in a case shall enter an appearance within 30 days after the latter of entry of this Order or service or an amended complaint upon defendants, without prejudice to any defenses or positions that defendants may have. Counsel who entered an appearance in a ease prior to its transfer do not need to enter a new appearance. All counsel are directed to apply for an ECF password issued by this Court. Please visit the Court's website at nysd.uscourts.gov to complete the on-line registration form. For assistance with the FCF filing system, or with applying for admission pro hac vice, counsel should contact the Court's FeF Help Desk, at 212-805-0800. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/28/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(js)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-09409-RJH, 1:11-md-02296-RJH. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo)
December 22, 2011 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
December 22, 2011 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. (sjo)
December 22, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
December 22, 2011 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:11-md-02296-RJH. (sjo)
December 22, 2011 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:11-md-02296-RJH. (sjo)
December 22, 2011 Filing 151 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Massachusetts; Case Number: 1:11-cv-10982. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
December 20, 2011 Filing 150 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order in MDL Case 2296 received from the Southern District of New York requesting the ELECTRONIC transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-10985-NMG, 1:11-cv-10982-NMG(Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
December 20, 2011 Filing 149 Copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order in MDL Case 2296 received from the mdl panel. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-10985-NMG, 1:11-cv-10982-NMG(Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
December 16, 2011 Filing 148 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered: The motion (#123) for appointment of counsel is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk shall also send the plaintiff a copy of the November 2, 2011 order (#124) granting the plaintiffs motion to modify the stay order. (PSSA, 1)[remark: copy of docket and #124 sent to plaintiff with this Order]. [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
December 15, 2011 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew T. Imbriglio on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company (Imbriglio, Andrew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
December 12, 2011 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary C. Dunn on behalf of Dorothy Russell Shattuck (Dunn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
December 2, 2011 Filing 145 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trustees of Boston College. (Martin, D.) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
December 2, 2011 Filing 144 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harvard University. (Martin, D.) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
December 2, 2011 Filing 143 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Loomis Sayles Credit Alpha Fund. (Martin, D.) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
December 2, 2011 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Ross Martin on behalf of Harvard University (Martin, D.) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
December 2, 2011 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Ross Martin on behalf of Marcia Tingley (Martin, D.) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
December 2, 2011 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Ross Martin on behalf of Trustees of Boston College (Martin, D.) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
December 2, 2011 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Ross Martin on behalf of Loomis Sayles Credit Alpha Fund (Martin, D.) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
December 2, 2011 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Ross Martin on behalf of Francis L. Coolidge (Martin, D.) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
December 1, 2011 Filing 137 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Marshfield Clinic Master Trust served on 9/19/2011, answer due 10/11/2011. Acknowledgement filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
December 1, 2011 Filing 136 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Richard Paniagua served on 9/29/2011, answer due 10/20/2011. Acknowledgement filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Ross Martin on behalf of Harvard University (Martin, D.) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
November 29, 2011 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #134 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Hal Neier and Robert J. Lack. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Moore, Kellyann) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
November 28, 2011 Filing 134 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert J. Lack, Hal Neier Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-3690233 by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
November 28, 2011 Filing 133 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Vikram Parvataneni, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund, State Street AMR, I.B.E.W. 103, Palmer & Dodge LLP, MML Equity Income Fund, Fiduciary SSB, Onebeacon America Insurance Co., Cambridge Appleton Trust Co., Harvard University, Boston Trust & Investment Management Company, Onebeacon Insurance Pension Plan, George E Keeler, Northern Assurance Co. of America, Ontario Pension Board, Anne-Marie S Greenberg, David C De Sieyes, Reed US Retirement Plan, Investors Bank and Trust Institutional Company, Francis L. Coolidge, Marshfield Clinic Master Trust, Onebeacon Insurance Co., Edwin J Hayes, Jr, State Street Bank & Trust Co. as Successor to Investors Bank Trust Company, Marcia Tingley, UD VS Risley CJ DE Sieyes et al, Managed Pension Funds Limited (MFS Funds (UK), Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, State Street Bank & Trust Company, LPL Financial, Rhumbline S. A. Free S&P Index, Matsco Incorporated, Frederick Goldstein, The Peoples Bank, Mill Shares Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Fully Managed, SSB-Trust Custody, Republic Bank and Trust Co., GBL Alpha Edge Common Trust FD, MML Blend Fund, Putnam S&P 500 Fund, Fifth Third Bank, Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, Walter K Taylor, Connell Family Partnership Trust, Pennsylvania General Insurance Co., Equiserve Exchange Agent Overage, John T Risley, State Street Bank & Trust Co. as Successor to Investors Bank Trust Company/Institutional Custody, Dorothy Russell Shattuck, Trustees of Boston College, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Bernard E & Edith B. Waterman Charitable Foundation, State Street Bank & Trust Co./IBT-Account #2, Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Loomis Sayles Credit Alpha Fund, Karen Rapkin, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund, Employers' Fire Insurance Company, Fiduciary Trust Co., Pension Reserves Investment Trust Fund, UD Virginia S. Risley JT Risley, Commercial Banking Client Rang, UD VS Risley DC De Sieyes et al., Putnam S&P 500 Index Fund, Charles J De Sieyes, Richard Paniagua, Investors Bank & Trust Co, State Street Bank & Trust, IBEW Local 103 Pension Plan, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Equity 401K, Aloysius J Franz, GBL Alpha Edge Common Trst FD & Trust Company, The Trust by Margaret R. Coniglio u/a dtd 08/22/1989, Bracebridge Capital LLC, John Doe, as Trustee of the Connell Family Partnership Trust, Strongbow Ltd, Beverly Mackintosh, as Trustee of the Trust u/a dtd 8/22/1989 by Mary Coniglio, Waterman Broadcasting Corp Employee Profit Sharing Plan u/a 01/01/1974, Manulife Asset Management (US) LLC, Anne G. Taylor, as Trustee of the Trust by Walter E. Graham u/a dtd 10-16-2000, John Doe, as Administrator of IBEW Local 103 Pension Plan, William H. Risley, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as Settlor, and William H. Risley, David C. De Sieyes, and United States Trust Company of New York, as Trustees, Harvard Management Co., Jennifer Grumhaus Daly, Martha D. Donahue, SA U.S. Market Fund, Charles Joseph De Sieyes, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, Charles Joseph De Sieyes and United States T, John Doe, as administrator Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, Fiduciary Company Incorporated, The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee of the Bank of New York Mellon Decommissioning Collective Trust Investment Plan - DT Broad Market Stock Index Fund, F&C Management Limited, John Doe, as Trustee of Pension Reserves Investment Trust Fund, The Kraft Group, Welch and Forbes LLC, John Doe, as Trustee of Marshfield Clinic Master Trust, John Doe, as Administrator of Ontario Pension Board, Homeland Insurance Company of New York, William H. Risley, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 19, 1977 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley and United States Trust Company of New York, as Trus, State Street Bank & Trust Co., as Owner of IBT-Account # 2, John Doe as Owner of C. Boynton Index 500 Portfolio, John Doe, as Administrator of OneBeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Equity 401K, Bernard E. Waterman, The Trust u/a dtd 8/22/1989 by Mary Coniglio GSTT TE Trust, Margaret R. Coniglio, as Trustee of the Trust by Margaret R Coniglio u/a dtd 08/22/1989, Walter E. Graham, FM Global, John Doe, as Administrator of Waterman Broadcasting Corp Employee Profit Sharing Plan u/a 01/01/7974, Investors Bank & Trust, John Doe, as Administrator of OneBeacon Insurance Pension Plan, C. Boynton Index 500 Portfolio, Reed Elsevier, Fiduciary Trust Company International, The Trust by Walter E. Graham u/a dtd 10-16-2000, Olifant Fund Ltd., John Doe, as Trustee of GBL Alpha Edge Common Trust Fund, David C. De Sieyes, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, David C. De Sieyes, and United States Trust Compan, State Street Trust and Banking Co Ltd., Waterman Broadcasting Inc, William H. Risley, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, Charles Joseph De Sieyes and United States Trust Co, Michael C. Donahue, Connell Limited Partnership, Palmer & Dodge, SA U.S. Value Fund, Hyde Park Savings Bank, The Trust for the benefit of C. Boynton u/a A. Johnson, State St. Bank & Trust Co., Bernard Waterman, John Doe, as Administrator of OneBeacon Insurance Savings Plan, John Doe, as Administrator of Reed US Retirement Plan, John Doe, as Owner of SSBT Onmibus Account, Edwards, Angell, Palmer & Dodge as Successor to Palmer & Dodge, Putnam Fiduciary Trust Company, as Trustee of Putnam S&P 500 Index Fund, Adage Capital Advisors Long, Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, in its capacity as Trustee of the Trust for the benefit of C. Boynton u/a A. Johnson, Bernard E. Waterman and Edith B. Waterman, The Trust by Edwin J. Hayes Jr. u/a dtd 5/26/2006, Edwin J. Hayes, as Trustee of the Trust by Edwin J. Hayes Jr. u/a dtd 5/26/2006, Beverly Mackintosh, as Trustee of the Trust u/a dtd 8/22/1989 by Mary Coniglio GSTT TE Trust, The Trust u/a dtd 8/22/1989 by Mary Coniglio, John Doe, as Owner of State Street Bank & Trust Co / IBT-Account # 2, United States Trust Company of New York, Kathy Kuzmich, Cambridge Appleton Trust National Association, John Doe, as Administrator of OneBeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Fully Managed, filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
November 16, 2011 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Ricciuti on behalf of State Street AMR (Ricciuti, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
November 16, 2011 Filing 131 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Street AMR. (Tosi, Ryan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
November 16, 2011 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Tosi on behalf of State Street AMR (Tosi, Ryan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
November 15, 2011 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by John K Sherwood on behalf of IBEW Local 103 Pension Plan (Sherwood, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
November 14, 2011 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley M. Varghese on behalf of Edwin J Hayes, Edwin J Hayes, Jr, Trustee U/A DTD 5-26-2006 by Edwin J. Hayes Jr. (Varghese, Lesley) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
November 4, 2011 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Don M. Kennedy on behalf of Republic Bank and Trust Co. (Kennedy, Don) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
November 4, 2011 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Don M. Kennedy on behalf of Boston Trust & Investment Management Company (Kennedy, Don) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
November 3, 2011 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton:ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #117 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Deborah Newman and Mitchell Hurley. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Moore, Kellyann) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
November 3, 2011 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #102 Motion for Leave to File Document and Clarification of Sealing Order; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Patch, Christine) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
November 3, 2011 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines for Fiduciary Trust Co. per #121 Stipulation. (Patch, Christine) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
November 3, 2011 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines for State Street Bank & Trust Company, State Street Trust and Banking per #119 Stipulation. (Patch, Christine) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
November 2, 2011 Filing 124 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered granting #118 Motion to Modify Stay Order. (Moore, Kellyann) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 31, 2011 Filing 123 MOTION in letter form to Appoint Counsel filed by Richard Paniagua.(Moore, Kellyann) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 31, 2011 Filing 122 ANSWER of Richard Paniagua to Plaintiff's #26 Amended Complaint filed by Richard Paniagua.(Moore, Kellyann) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 31, 2011 Filing 121 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Fiduciary Trust Co.. (Findlen, Trevor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 31, 2011 Filing 120 ANSWER to #26 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,, by Beverly Mackintosh, Trustee of the Trust U/A DTD 8-22-1989 By Mary Coniglio.(Hermes, Peter) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 31, 2011 Filing 119 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond by State Street Bank & Trust. (Mack, David) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 25, 2011 DOCKET SHEET sent to Richard Paniagua. (Moore, Kellyann) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 24, 2011 Filing 118 MOTION to Modify Stay Order and Memorandum of Law in Support by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 24, 2011 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton:ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #116 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added John K. Sherwood. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Moore, Kellyann) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 24, 2011 Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Deborah Newman and Mitchell Hurley Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-3639053 by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah Newman, #2 Declaration of Mitchell Hurley)(Brewer, Donna) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 21, 2011 Filing 116 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John K. Sherwood Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3638413 by I.B.E.W. 103, IBEW Local 103 Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bradley, Garrett) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 21, 2011 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett J. Bradley on behalf of I.B.E.W. 103, IBEW Local 103 Pension Plan (Bradley, Garrett) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 20, 2011 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter G. Hermes on behalf of Trustee of the Trust U/A DTD 8-22-1989 By Mary Coniglio (Hermes, Peter) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 20, 2011 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter G. Hermes on behalf of Beverly Mackintosh (Hermes, Peter) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 20, 2011 Filing 112 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DT Board Market Stock Index Fund. (Harshbarger, L.) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 20, 2011 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by L. Scott Harshbarger on behalf of DT Board Market Stock Index Fund (Harshbarger, L.) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 18, 2011 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Re: Motion for Leave to File, Docket No. #102 document replaced to extract #107 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #109 Ceritifcate of Consultation, and #110 Proposed Order. These documents should be filed separately from the motion they relate to. (Moore, Kellyann) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 18, 2011 Filing 107 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Street Bank & Trust. (Mack, David) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 18, 2011 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by David B Mack on behalf of State Street Bank & Trust (Mack, David) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 18, 2011 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton:ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #105 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Vincent R. Cappucci. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Moore, Kellyann) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 17, 2011 Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Vincent R. Cappucci Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3629279 by Marshfield Clinic Master Trust. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Fine, David) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 17, 2011 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Fine on behalf of Marshfield Clinic Master Trust (Fine, David) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 13, 2011 Filing 110 Proposed Order submitted by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company by John T. Morrier. (Moore, Kellyann) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 13, 2011 Filing 109 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 and 15.1 by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company filed by John T. Morrier. (Moore, Kellyann) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 13, 2011 Filing 108 MEMORANDUM in Support re #102 MOTION for Leave to File (I) Second Amended Complaint and (II) An Order Clarifying or Modifying the Court's Prior Sealing Order with Memorandum in Support and L.R. 7.1 and 15.1 Certification MOTION for Leave to File (I) Second Amended Complaint and (II) An Order Clarifying or Modifying the Court's Prior Sealing Order with Memorandum in Support and L.R. 7.1 and 15.1 Certification filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Moore, Kellyann) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 13, 2011 Filing 103 NOTICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company of Limited Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 13, 2011 Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to File (I) Second Amended Complaint and (II) An Order Clarifying or Modifying the Court's Prior Sealing Order with Memorandum in Support and L.R. 7.1 and 15.1 Certification by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint)(Morrier, John) (Main Document 102 replaced on 10/18/2011) (Moore, Kellyann). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 12, 2011 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Walsh on behalf of Cambridge Appleton Trust Co. (Walsh, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 7, 2011 Filing 100 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Peoples Bank identifying Corporate Parent Krey Co. Ltd for The Peoples Bank.. (Fecteau, Jonah) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 4, 2011 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Grant on behalf of Palmer & Dodge LLP (Grant, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 4, 2011 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Swope on behalf of Palmer & Dodge LLP (Swope, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 3, 2011 Filing 97 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MML Blend Fund, MML Equity Income Fund, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund. (O'Keeffe, Kate) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 3, 2011 Filing 96 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund. (O'Keeffe, Kate) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 3, 2011 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate M. O'Keeffe on behalf of Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund (O'Keeffe, Kate) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
October 3, 2011 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate M. O'Keeffe on behalf of MML Blend Fund, MML Equity Income Fund, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund (O'Keeffe, Kate) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 27, 2011 Filing 93 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered granting #80 Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Summons and Complaint. (Patch, Christine) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 23, 2011 Filing 92 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Marcia Tingley served on 8/27/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. Acknowledgement filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 23, 2011 Filing 91 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. The Peoples Bank served on 8/15/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. Acknowledgement filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 23, 2011 Filing 90 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Republic Bank and Trust Co. served on 8/16/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. Acknowledgement filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 22, 2011 Filing 89 NOTICE of Order Granting Motion to Suspend Panel Rule 4.1 for Non-Appearing Parties, filed in MDL No. 2296. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-10982-NMG, 1:11-cv-10985-NMG(Patch, Christine) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 16, 2011 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric P. Magnuson on behalf of The Peoples Bank (Magnuson, Eric) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 15, 2011 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonah M. Fecteau on behalf of The Peoples Bank (Fecteau, Jonah) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 14, 2011 Filing 86 ANSWER to #26 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,, by Matsco Incorporated.(Brighenti, Simon) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 12, 2011 Filing 85 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Putnam Fiduciary Trust Company, Trustee, Putnam S&P 500 Index Fund identifying Corporate Parent Great-West Financial (Canada) Inc., Corporate Parent Great-West Lifeco U.S. Inc., Corporate Parent Putnam Investments, LLC, Corporate Parent Great-West Financial (Nova Scotia) Co., Corporate Parent Putnam U.S. Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Putnam Acquisition Financing LLC, Corporate Parent Putnam Acquisition Financing Inc., Corporate Parent Great-West Lifeco Inc. for Putnam Fiduciary Trust Company, Trustee.. (Moloney, Ainsley) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 12, 2011 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Ainsley G. Moloney on behalf of Putnam Fiduciary Trust Company, Trustee, Putnam S&P 500 Index Fund (Moloney, Ainsley) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 12, 2011 Filing 83 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Document received: Order. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 12, 2011 Filing 82 DECLARATION re #80 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 30, 2012 to Serve Summons and Complaint, #81 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 12, 2011 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM in Support re #80 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 30, 2012 to Serve Summons and Complaint filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 12, 2011 Filing 80 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 30, 2012 to Serve Summons and Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company.(Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 8, 2011 Filing 79 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trust U/AA. (Reilly, Stephen) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 8, 2011 Filing 78 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fiduciary Trust Co. identifying Corporate Parent Fiduciary Company Incorporated for Fiduciary Trust Co... (Laredo, Marc) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 7, 2011 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Connell Family Partnership Trust re #76 Notice of Appearance. (Dennis, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 7, 2011 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Dennis on behalf of Connell Family Partnership Trust (Dennis, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 75 SUMMONS Returned Executed Beverly Mackintosh served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011; Trustee of the Trust U/A DTD 8-22-1989 By Mary Coniglio served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 74 SUMMONS Returned Executed State Street Bank & Trust served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 73 SUMMONS Returned Executed Margaret R Coniglio served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011; Trustee of the TRUST U/A/DTD 8-22-1989 by Margaret R. Coniglio Trust served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 72 SUMMONS Returned Executed Vikram Parvataneni served on 8/25/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 71 SUMMONS Returned Executed Reed US Retirement Plan served on 8/24/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 70 SUMMONS Returned Executed Frederick Goldstein served on 8/25/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 69 SUMMONS Returned Executed UD VS Risley DC De Sieyes et al. served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 68 SUMMONS Returned Executed Trustees of Boston College served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 67 SUMMONS Returned Executed State Street Trust and Banking served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 66 SUMMONS Returned Executed State Street Bank & Trust Company served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 65 SUMMONS Returned Executed State Street Bank & Trust Co./IBT-Account #2 served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 64 SUMMONS Returned Executed State Street Bank & Trust Co. as Successor to Investors Bank Trust Company/Institutional Custody served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 63 SUMMONS Returned Executed State Street Bank & Trust Co. as Successor to Investors Bank Trust Company served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 62 SUMMONS Returned Executed State Street AMR served on 8/12/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed SSB-Trust Custody served on 8/12/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed SSBT Omnibus Account served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed Rhumbline S. A. Free S&P Index served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 58 SUMMONS Returned Executed Putnam S&P 500 Index Fund served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 57 SUMMONS Returned Executed Putnam S&P 500 Fund served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 56 SUMMONS Returned Executed Pension Reserves Investment Trust Fund served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ontario Pension Board served on 8/15/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed MML Equity Income Fund served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed MML Blend Fund served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed Marshfield Clinic Master Trust served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed Manulife U.S. Equity Fund served on 8/12/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX served on 8/12/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed Managed Pension Funds Limited (MFS Funds (UK) served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed Investors Bank and Trust Institutional Company served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed Harvard University served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed Anne-Marie S Greenberg served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed GBL Alpha Edge Common Trst FD & Trust Company served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed Fiduciary SSB served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed Equiserve Exchange Agent Overage served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed DT Board Market Stock Index Fund served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed Commercial Banking Client Rang served on 8/12/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan served on 8/12/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed Francis L. Coolidge served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed Boston Trust & Investment Management Company served on 8/11/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
August 31, 2011 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Greaney on behalf of Trust U/AA (Greaney, Jennifer) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
August 31, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C. Reilly on behalf of Trust U/AA (Reilly, Stephen) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
August 30, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Pemstein on behalf of Employers' Fire Insurance Company, Mill Shares Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd, Northern Assurance Co. of America, Onebeacon America Insurance Co., Onebeacon Insurance Co., Onebeacon Insurance Pension Plan, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Equity 401K, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Fully Managed, Pennsylvania General Insurance Co. (Pemstein, Joshua) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
August 30, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Z. Schwartz on behalf of Employers' Fire Insurance Company, Mill Shares Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd, Northern Assurance Co. of America, Onebeacon America Insurance Co., Onebeacon Insurance Co., Onebeacon Insurance Pension Plan, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Equity 401K, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Fully Managed, Pennsylvania General Insurance Co. (Schwartz, Andrew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
August 26, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Wystan M. Ackerman on behalf of Charles J De Sieyes, David C De Sieyes, John T Risley, UD VS Risley CJ DE Sieyes et al, UD VS Risley DC De Sieyes et al., UD Virginia S. Risley JT Risley (Ackerman, Wystan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
August 25, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Simon J. Brighenti, Jr on behalf of Matsco Incorporated (Brighenti, Simon) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
August 22, 2011 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Bernard E. Waterman and Edith B. Waterman, JTWROS, Rhumbline S. A. Free S&P Index, Vikram Parvataneni, LPL Financial, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund, Matsco Incorporated, Frederick Goldstein, The Peoples Bank, State Street AMR, Trustee of the TRUST U/A/DTD 8-22-1989 by Margaret R. Coniglio Trust, I.B.E.W. 103, Palmer & Dodge LLP, MML Equity Income Fund, Anne E Taylor, RE State St. Bank & Trust Co., Fiduciary SSB, Onebeacon America Insurance Co., Cambridge Appleton Trust Co., Mill Shares Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd, Harvard University, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Fully Managed, Boston Trust & Investment Management Company, Beverly Mackintosh, Onebeacon Insurance Pension Plan, Trustee of the Trust U/A DTD 10-16-2000 by Walter K. Graham FBO Walter E. Graham, George E Keeler, SSB-Trust Custody, Northern Assurance Co. of America, Johnson FBO C. Boynton, Republic Bank and Trust Co., Ontario Pension Board, GBL Alpha Edge Common Trust FD, Trust U/AA, Anne-Marie S Greenberg, MML Blend Fund, Putnam S&P 500 Fund, Fifth Third Bank, Walter K Taylor, David C De Sieyes, Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, State Street Trust and Banking, Putnam Fiduciary Trust Company, Trustee, Connell Family Partnership Trust, Trustee U/A DTD 5-26-2006 by Edwin J. Hayes Jr., Pennsylvania General Insurance Co., John T Risley, Reed US Retirement Plan, Equiserve Exchange Agent Overage, Investors Bank and Trust Institutional Company, State Street Bank & Trust Co. as Successor to Investors Bank Trust Company/Institutional Custody, DT Board Market Stock Index Fund, Francis L. Coolidge, Dorothy Russell Shattuck, Marshfield Clinic Master Trust, Trustees of Boston College, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Trustee of the Trust U/A DTD 8-22-1989 By Mary Coniglio, Bernard E & Edith B. Waterman Charitable Foundation, State Street Bank & Trust Co./IBT-Account #2, Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Edwin J Hayes, Loomis Sayles Credit Alpha Fund, Karen Rapkin, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan, Employers' Fire Insurance Company, Margaret R Coniglio, Onebeacon Insurance Co., Fiduciary Trust Co., Edwin J Hayes, Jr, UD Virginia S. Risley JT Risley, Pension Reserves Investment Trust Fund, Commercial Banking Client Rang, UD VS Risley DC De Sieyes et al., State Street Bank & Trust Co. as Successor to Investors Bank Trust Company, Marcia Tingley, Putnam S&P 500 Index Fund, Charles J De Sieyes, Investors Bank & Trust Co, Richard Paniagua, State Street Bank & Trust, SSBT Omnibus Account, IBEW Local 103 Pension Plan, UD VS Risley CJ DE Sieyes et al, Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan - Equity 401K, Aloysius J Franz, Managed Pension Funds Limited (MFS Funds (UK), GBL Alpha Edge Common Trst FD & Trust Company, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, State Street Bank & Trust Company, filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
August 22, 2011 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LPL Financial identifying Corporate Parent LPL Investment Holdings, Inc. for LPL Financial.. (Wolosz, Justin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
August 22, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin J. Wolosz on behalf of LPL Financial (Wolosz, Justin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
August 17, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company of Motion for Transfer for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sec. 1407 (Attachments: #1 Notice of MDL Motion, #2 Brief in Support of Motion, #3 Declaration of Zensky, #4 Schedule of Actions, #5 Proof of Service)(Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
August 10, 2011 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Grant on behalf of Palmer & Dodge LLP (Grant, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
August 10, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Swope on behalf of Palmer & Dodge LLP (Swope, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
August 3, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor M. Findlen on behalf of Fiduciary Trust Co. (Findlen, Trevor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
August 3, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc C. Laredo on behalf of Fiduciary Trust Co. (Laredo, Marc) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
August 2, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Lombardo on behalf of Equiserve Exchange Agent Overage (Lombardo, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
August 2, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick V. Lochbihler on behalf of Equiserve Exchange Agent Overage (Lochbihler, Frederick) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
July 29, 2011 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 , #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joseph P. Lombardo and Frederick V. Lochbihler. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Duong, Diep) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
July 28, 2011 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Frederick V. Lochbihler Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3518922 by Equiserve Exchange Agent Overage. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lochbihler)(Gilleran, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
July 28, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joseph P. Lombardo Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3518855 by Equiserve Exchange Agent Overage. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lombardo)(Gilleran, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
July 28, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Gilleran on behalf of Equiserve Exchange Agent Overage (Gilleran, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
July 15, 2011 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sunish Gulati, Natalie Lesser, and Katherine Scully. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Patch, Christine) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
July 14, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sunish Gulati, Natalie Lesser and Katherine Scully Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 0101-3496764 by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sunish Gulati, #2 Declaration of Natalie Lesser, #3 Declaration of Katherine Scully)(Brewer, Donna) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
July 7, 2011 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Daniel H. Golden, David M. Zensky, Stephen M. Baldini, James P. Chou, Angeline Lam Koo, and Jason L. Goldsmith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Duong, Diep) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
July 6, 2011 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines for All Defendants. (Patch, Christine) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
July 6, 2011 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting (10) Motion to Stay Defendants' Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint in case 1:11-cv-10982-NMG; granting (12) Motion to Stay Defendants' Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint in case 1:11-cv-10985-NMG Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-10982-NMG, 1:11-cv-10985-NMG(Patch, Christine) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
July 1, 2011 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of David M. Zensky in Support re #10 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of October 31, 2011, or Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, or Further Order of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware or This Court filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Brewer, Donna) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
July 1, 2011 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of October 31, 2011, or Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, or Further Order of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware or This Court filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Brewer, Donna) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
July 1, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of October 31, 2011, or Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, or Further Order of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware or This Court by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brewer, Donna) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
June 17, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Daniel H. Golden, David M. Zensky, Stephen M. Baldini, James P. Chou, Angeline Lam Koo, and Jason L. Goldsmith Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-3459319 by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #5 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #6 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Brewer, Donna) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
June 8, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna Marie Brewer on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company (Brewer, Donna) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
June 3, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas K. Mansfield on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (Mansfield, Douglas) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
June 3, 2011 Filing 5 Summons Issued as all defendants . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Paine, Matthew) Modified on 6/6/2011 (Duong, Diep). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
June 3, 2011 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Abaid, Kimberly) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
June 2, 2011 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of John T. Morrier re #3 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit A to the Complaint Under Seal (ex parte) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
June 2, 2011 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit A to the Complaint Under Seal (ex parte) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
June 2, 2011 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]
June 2, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-3435079 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Morrier, John) Modified on 6/6/2011 (Duong, Diep). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas v. Richard Paniagua et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kraft Group
Represented By: Charles Lorin Solomont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. De Sieyes, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, David C. De Sieyes, and United States Trust Compan
Represented By: Seth M. Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GBL Alpha Edge Common Trst FD & Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel S. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madge A. L. Macneil Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 134 Pension Plan No. 5 S&P 500 Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, as Trustee of Pension Reserves Investment Trust Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investors Bank & Trust Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, as trustee of JHT New Income Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onebeacon Insurance Company, as Administrator of Onebeacon Insurance Pension Plan
Represented By: Alan Joseph Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spindle Limited partnership Balanced Advisory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret R. Coniglio, as Trustee of the Trust by Margaret R Coniglio u/a dtd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Trust under an Agreement dated December 19, 1977 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley and United States Trust Company of New York, as Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RE State St. Bank & Trust Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe as Owner of C. Boynton Index 500 Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C De Sieyes
Represented By: Seth M. Kean
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge Appleton Trust Co.
Represented By: Kevin J. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiduciary Trust Company International
Represented By: Seth M. Kean
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Boynton Index 500 Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JFH II Spectrum Income Fund
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Represented By: Stuart Todd Steinberg
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Represented By: Scott Cameron Kessenick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hancock Funds II (Equity-Income Fund)
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Represented By: Stuart Todd Steinberg
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Represented By: Scott Cameron Kessenick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, as Owner of State Street Bank & Trust Co / IBT-Account # 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T Risley
Represented By: Seth M. Kean
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mill Shares Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd
Represented By: Andrew Zane Schwartz
Represented By: Joshua S. Pemstein
Represented By: Alan Joseph Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F&C Management Limited
Represented By: Michael C. D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania General Insurance Co.
Represented By: Andrew Zane Schwartz
Represented By: Joshua S. Pemstein
Represented By: Alan Joseph Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carr Total Return Fund Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State St. Bank & Trust Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Peoples Bank
Represented By: Jonah M. Fecteau
Represented By: Eric P. Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Elsevier
Represented By: Harry Frischer
Represented By: Stephen Leonard Ratner
Represented By: David Steve Mordkoff
Represented By: Carl Clyde Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyde Park Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, as Administrator of OneBeacon Insurance Savings Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manulife Mutual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Tingley
Represented By: D. Ross Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee U/A DTD by Edwin J. Hayes Jr.
Represented By: Lesley M. Varghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SA U.S. Market Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MB Financial Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne-Marie S Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, in its capacity as Trustee of the Trust for the benefit of C. Boynton u/a A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy L. Drummey, as trustee of the Deld Family Foundation trust UAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, as Administrator of Waterman Broadcasting Corp Employee Profit Sharing Plan u/a
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UD VS Risley CJ DE Sieyes et al
Represented By: Seth M. Kean
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua F. Lombard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natixis Funds Trust II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Management Co.
Represented By: D. Ross Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William W. Howells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madge A. L. Macneil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UD Virginia S. Risley JT Risley
Represented By: Seth M. Kean
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Bank & Trust Co., as successor to Investors Bank Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Grumhaus Daly
Represented By: Jonathan W. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeland Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Alan Joseph Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JHF II Spectrum Income Fund
Represented By: Scott Cameron Kessenick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard University
Represented By: D. Ross Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Bank & Trust Co. as Successor to Investors Bank Trust Company/Institutional Custody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhumbline Advisers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.B.E.W. 103
Represented By: Garrett J. Bradley
Represented By: John K Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard E & Edith B. Waterman Charitable Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 143 S&P 500 Index Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Represented By: Kate M. O'Keeffe
Represented By: Stuart Todd Steinberg
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Represented By: William Kennedy Dodds
Represented By: Scott Cameron Kessenick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter K Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Trust by Margaret R. Coniglio u/a dtd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBEW Local 103 Pension Plan
Represented By: Garrett J. Bradley
Represented By: John K Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pension Reserves Investment Trust Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha D. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard E. Waterman and Edith B. Waterman, JTWROS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, as Administrator of Reed US Retirement Plan
Represented By: Harry Frischer
Represented By: Stephen Leonard Ratner
Represented By: David Steve Mordkoff
Represented By: Carl Clyde Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Trust for the benefit of C. Boynton u/a A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President and Fellows of Harvard College
Represented By: D. Ross Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Trust Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manulife U.S. Equity Fund
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Represented By: Kate M. O'Keeffe
Represented By: Stuart Todd Steinberg
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Represented By: William Kennedy Dodds
Represented By: Scott Cameron Kessenick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne E Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPL Financial
Represented By: Justin J. Wolosz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deld Family Foundation Trust UAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley C. Beal Gegenheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, as Administrator of OneBeacon Insurance Pension Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DL Partners LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Mackintosh
Represented By: Peter G. Hermes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Assurance Co. of America
Represented By: Andrew Zane Schwartz
Represented By: Joshua S. Pemstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aloysius J Franz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Hills Bank (f/k/a Hyde Park Savings Bank)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin J Hayes, Jr.
Represented By: Lesley M. Varghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret R Coniglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Bank & Trust Co./IBT-Account #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Rapkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard E. Waterman and Edith B. Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Trust and Banking Co Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Bank & Trust Co., as Owner of IBT-Account # 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madge A. L. Macneil, as trustee of the madge A. L. Macneil trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. Risley, as trustee of the trust under an agreement dated December 19, 1977 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley and United States Trust company of New York, as Trustee
Represented By: Seth M. Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiduciary Trust Company International, as Trustee of a Trust under an agreement dated December 19, 1977 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley and United States Trust Company of
Represented By: Seth M. Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, as Trustee of the Connell Family Partnership Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Risley, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 19, 1977 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley and United States Trust Company of New York, as Trus
Represented By: Seth M. Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter E. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investors Bank and Trust Institutional Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Bank & Trust Company
Represented By: David B. Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmer & Dodge LLP
Represented By: Michael T. Grant
Represented By: Jeffrey Swope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manulife Mutual Funds
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Represented By: Stuart Todd Steinberg
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Represented By: Scott Cameron Kessenick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UD VS Risley DC De Sieyes et al.
Represented By: Seth M. Kean
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Putnam S&P 500 Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Paniagua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Represented By: Kate M. O'Keeffe
Represented By: Stuart Todd Steinberg
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Represented By: William Kennedy Dodds
Represented By: Scott Cameron Kessenick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshfield Clinic Master Trust
Represented By: David J. Fine
Represented By: Vincent Roger Cappucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Trust Under an agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, adn William H. Risley, Charles Joseph De Sieyes and United States Trust Company of New York, as trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiduciary Trust Co.
Represented By: Marc C. Laredo
Represented By: Trevor Michael Findlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Trust Company of New York, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Viriginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, David C. De Sieyes, and Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Elsevier Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Bank and Trust Co.
Represented By: Don M Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Trust by Walter E. Graham u/a dtd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pension Reserves Investment Management Board, as trustee of Pension Reserves Investment Trust Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GBL Alpha Edge Common Trust FD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The President and Fellows of Harvard College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pension Reserves Investment Management Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Mackintosh, as Trustee of the Trust u/a dtd by Mary Coniglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hancock variable insurance trust (f/k/a John Hancock Trust (New Income Trust))
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Represented By: Stuart Todd Steinberg
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Represented By: Scott Cameron Kessenick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vikram Parvataneni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, as Administrator of Ontario Pension Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Managed Pension Funds Limited (MFS Funds (UK))
Represented By: Michael C. D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street AMR
Represented By: Michael D. Ricciuti
Represented By: Ryan M. Tosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MassMutual Premier Funds
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Represented By: Stuart Todd Steinberg
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Represented By: Scott Cameron Kessenick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Represented By: Kate M. O'Keeffe
Represented By: Stuart Todd Steinberg
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Represented By: William Kennedy Dodds
Represented By: Scott Cameron Kessenick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, as Administrator of IBEW Local 103 Pension Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin J. Hayes, as Trustee of the Trust by Edwin J. Hayes Jr. u/a dtd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman W. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterman Broadcasting Corp Employee Profit Sharing Plan u/a
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest Reinsurance (Bermuda) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adage Capital Advisors Long
Represented By: David Keith Momborquette
Represented By: Kristie Marie Blase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Elsevier Inc., as Administrator of Reed Elsevier US Retirement Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidicuiary Trust Company International, as Trustee of a Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as Settlor, and William H. Risley, Charles Joseph De Sieyes and Uni
Represented By: Seth M. Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loomis Sayles Credit Alpha Fund
Represented By: D. Ross Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee of the Bank of New York Mellon Decommissioning Collective Trust Investment Plan - DT Broad Market Stock Index Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Trust & Investment Management Company
Represented By: Don M Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmer & Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massmutual Select Funds
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Represented By: Stuart Todd Steinberg
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Represented By: Scott Cameron Kessenick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onebeacon Insurance Savings Plan
Represented By: Andrew Zane Schwartz
Represented By: Joshua S. Pemstein
Represented By: Alan Joseph Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, as Trustee of Marshfield Clinic Master Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Elsevier US Retirement Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times