Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas et al v. First Republic Bank et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust Company, Board of Administration of the Water and Power Employees' Retirement Plan, incorrectly named as "Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV" and "Water, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al. and Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Defendant: Weintraub Capital Management, L.P., Florence S. Bradshaw, Board of Trustees of the Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension Plan, as administrator of the directors guild of America-Producer Pension Plan Basic Benefit Plan, Joshua Tree Capital Management LP, The Spurgeon Family Trust UAD, zoological Society of San Diego, a California, Mark Stranahan, Antoinette B. Brumbaugh, The J&M Trust UA Dated, Katherine B. Flynn, as Trustee of Declaration of Bell Family Trust UA, The Thomas decedents Trust U/S/T, Transamerica Series Trust (F/K/A Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust), The Roeland Family Trust UA, Southwest Carpenters Pension Trust, Daryl V. Dichek, Wilshire Mutual Funds, Inc., Timothy R. Kennedy, Enzo S. Ricciardelli, Lolita K. Wagner, Patricia Kaszton, ALLEGRO ASSOCIATES, James H. Eckhouse, Trudy V. Dunaway, Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Jr University, SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom, Joe Youssry Kelada, Eric I. Chang, The Woods/Mitchell Family Trust, Varda Rabin, Robert Ramsey, Gwendolyn G. Babcock, Barbro Osher, The Samuel S. Moore Trust U/A DTD, Sanger Living Trust, Carol Rhoads, Nancy Lobdell, Gelert R. Ramage, Jr., Marlowe G. Merkel, The Survivors' Trust CR UA Charles R. & Elizabeth F. Redmond Trust DTD, Carpenters Pension Trust for Northern California, Carl Zlatchin Profit, The Faulkner Family Trust UA DTS, Board of Trustees of the Southern California United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Food Employers Joint Pension Trust Fund, Sacramento County Emp Ret System, Dorothy Russell Shattuck, Catholic Healthcare West, Schwab Capital Trust, Dennis Eugene De Haas, Everest Reinsurance (Bermuda) Ltd., Glen W. Bell, Sally H. Contant, Jim Hicks, as Trustee of the Jim Hicks & Co. Employee Profit-Sharing Plan, George D Veon Trust U/A DTD, State of California, Department of Personnel Administration, Savings Plus Plan, Lois L. Flick, Karen Hammond, Declaration of Bell Family Trust Meadowbrooks Equity Fund UA, Ina Tillman, Randy Steiner, Lucile M. Dunn, Monumental Life Insurance Company f/k/a Peoples Benfit Life Insurance Company, Artis Partners 2X LP, Alexander B. Potts, The Margaret McKensie Living Trust U/A DTD, Debra A. Gastler, The Trust for the Benefit of Susan H. Shane, The Iris B. Mahoney Revocable Trust U/A/D, The Rosenberg Revocable Trust, Susan H. Shane, WILSHIRE 5000 INDEX FUND, City National Bank, Ofelia R. Pecaro, Patrick K. Stinehart, Laurie Mitchell, The Friedman Living Trust U/A, The Joseph M. Fee & Elizabeth Fee Revocable Living Trust, Coastview Equity Partners, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian for Brent V. Woods IRA Rollover, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Union Bank of California N.A.,, Gamma Phi Beta Foundation, Inc., Bernard Osher 2006 Charitable Remainder Unitrust #2, Eric Morris, Maria Finch Cannell, The E. Donald Heymann Trust, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Kay Walsh, Joanne Desherow Sanger, Michael Plonski, #502 U/W/O Minnette R. Eckhouse Trust, Spencer W. Beard, Bernard and Barbro Osher 2006 Charitable Remainder Unitrust #2, Lawrence H. Burks, The Betty H. Roeland Marital Trust, Brandes Investment Partners L.P., Robert N. Mohr, Successor Trustee to Joseph B. Mohr (erroneously named as Joseph B. Mohn), as Trustee of the J&M Trust UA Dated, Nancy Fay Johnson, Doheney Eye Institute, Robert C. Lobdell, SC Edison Nuclear Facilities, Schwab 1000 Index Fund, the Survivors' Trust, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian of the George William Buck SEP-IRA DTD, William J. Bell, Danica F. Hughes, The U/A DTA Joanne Desherow, board of Trustees of the carpenters pension trust fund for northern california, as administrator of the carpenters pension turst fund for northern california, William D. Mac Donald, John Lanfranki, James G. Up De Graff, Jeffrey Chandler, Ronald C. Cey, Wayne F. McNulty, JONESTRADING INSTITUTIONAL SERVICES LLC, Peter J. Fernald, Daniel H. Renberg, John E. Flick, Jeffrey J. Appleby, Omar F. Johnson Jr., Catholic Health West CHW, Mary Kathleen McNulty, The Fetherolf Family Trust, TERRILL F COX & LORRAINE M COX TRUST U/A DTD, William Stinehart Jr., California Physicians' Service D/B/A Blue Shield California, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios, Robert D. Nelson, Jeffrey A. Appley, as trustee of the James F. Polk Trust U/A dtd, John Doe, as administrator of the Archdiocese of Los Angeles Lay Employee Pension Plan, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, The Richard Haigler & Despina Haigler Living Trust U/A, PG&E Postretirment Medical Plan TR, Iris B. Mahoney, SA Funds Investment Trust, V.M. Brookes, Virginia Lanfranki, The Dichek Family Trust Dated, Charley Chunyu Lu, Carol Askin, Melissa A Monson, The William D. MacDonald & Nancy L. MacDonald Trust U/A 7/21, The Sally H. Contant Trust U/A DTD, the trust for the benefit of John A. Orb U/A/D, Jupiter Capital Partners LLC, Jung E. Lee, warren B. Williamson, as trustee of the Chandler Trust No. 1, The Cey Living Trust, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc, Charles Jasa, as personal representative of the Estate of Robert D. Nelson, Irene Baron, Rodolfo V. Gil, The Whittier Trust Company, Donald Baron, John W. Stewart II, The Alfred V. Tjarks Retirement Plan dtd, Samuel S. Moore, Robbie E. Monsma, Louise Rosenberg, E. Donald Heymann, Board of Directors of the Producer - Writer Guild of America Pension Plan, John A. Orb, Chandler Trust No. 1, Peter A. Young, The James F. Polk Trust U/A DTD, Shelley Weege, Kaiser Foundation Health, California Field Ironworkers Pension Trust, The Alfred W. Merkel Marlowe G. Merkel Trust, Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund (F/K/A Schwab Institutional Select S&P 500 Fund), Canyon Value Realization Fund, L.P., Los Angeles City Employees' Retirement System, Sherry P. Broder, Gamma Phi Beta Foundation, Leonard F. Hill, Vyvian Heath, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian of the Peter Marino IRA Rollover, Rabin Worldwide, Inc., Wedbush Morgan Securities, Inc., Lori Ann Talarico, Robert Friedman, Transamerica Partners Mid Value Portfolio (F/K/A Transameirca Partners Mid-Cap Value Portfolio F/K/A Diversified Investors Mid-Cap Value Portfolio), Catherine A. Verdusco, as trustee of the Francesca J. Verdusco trust U/A dtd, Warren J. Eide, Transamerica Blackrock Large Cap Value VP (F/K/A Transamerica T. Rowe Price Equity Income VP), Eugene Tillman, Aviv Nevo, Artis Partners (Institutional) LP, Kaiser Foundation Health Plans and Hospital, Betty H. Roeland, Ranjit Mathoda, Helen Grossman, Mark A. Hughes, Karen E. Dalton, Elizabeth G. Chamberlain Trust U/A DTD, Ynez Viole O'Neill, Jim Hicks, Gary E. Pekala, Ronald C. Cey, individually and as a Trustee of the Cey Living Trust, T.Rowe Price, Betty Beaird, Askin Family Trust, Sacramento County Ret Association, Marilyn N. Fetherolf, MC Investment Partners LLC, Paul M. Mahoney, Joy Leichenger, as trustee of the Joy Leichenger Trust, Cutler Group LP, John T. O'Loughlin, Blue Cross of California, Betty Ann Altman, Board of Administration of the Los Angeles City Employees' Retirement System, Roman Catholic Archbishop LA, Melissa Ma, Betty K Zlatchin, Thomas B. O'Keefe, Claretian Missionaries Western Province Inc., Sharon L. Boultinghouse Trust, Whittier Trust Company, The Pecaro Family Trust DTD, Southern California UFCWU & FE Joint Pension Trust Fund, The Trust for the Benefit of Sherry P. Broder U/A DTD, Alfred V. Tjarks, The James G. Up De Gradd Trust U/A, The Hill Revocable Living Trust DTD, The Tillman Family Trust U/A DTD, McConnell Foundation, Alfred W. Merkel, San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co., Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Board of Trustees of the Directors Guild of America - Producer Pension Plan, As Administrator of the Directors Guild of America -Producer Pension Plan Basic Benefit Plan, Jonathan A. Tillman, Sharron R. Beard, Monumental Life Insurance Company, on behalf of Separate Account L-23, sued herein as Monumental Life Insurance Co., as Owner of Teamsters Separate Account, Diane Buchanan Wilsey, Artis Partners 2x Ltd., The Wilk K. Weinstein Revocable Trust U/A dtd, The John Stewart Property Trust, The Tommie L. Cordero Trust, Imogene S. Peckham, Remdel Brothers, Robert Edward Bellack, City of Los Angeles Fire and Police Pension Plan, Derek M. Dalton, The John & Betty Altman Family Trust UAD, Betty K. Zlatchin, Bernard Shapiro, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, GCW Capital LLC, Brent V. Woods, Lisa Pritzker, Shannon Morris, Bernadette Fingleton, Glen W. bell Jr., as Trustee of Declaration of Bell Family Trust UA, California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust, Stephanie Murray, Wilshire Variable Insurance Trust, Yield Strategies Fund I, LP, State of California - Mid Cap Value, The Floyd C. Sanger Jr. Trust u/A, The Autry Community Property Trust Dated, The Don & Irene Baron Family Trust 7B-251, Sybil Jinx Robinson, Claude Rosenberg, Durham J. Monsma, Steven U. Lee, Richard T. Yu, SJC CAPITAL LLC, Mark Allen Itkin, Artis Capital Management LP, Irene M. McNulty, Janice Fay Johnson Ochs, Alfred V. Tjarks Jr., William F. Thomas, Delaware Charter Guarantee & Trust Company, The Trust for the Benefit of R.J. Brookes & V.M. Brookes, Francis G. Duggan, Quinn Martin Dolan, The Yeomans Family Trust U/A, The Trust U/A DTD for the Benefit of S. Keating and Carol Rhoads, First Republic Bank, The Helen Grossman Trust dated, Judy C. Webb, Bernard Osher Trust dated Discretionary Account, Despina Haigler, Sharon H. Boultinghouse, Declaration of Bell Family Trust UA, The Felicity J. Appleby Trust U/A DTD, Olivia Jean Williams, Santa Barbara County Employees Retirement System, Marilyn M. Matheson, RWB, The Miller Family Trust, Willow Creek Capital Partners, Directors Guild of america-Producer Pension Plan Basic Benefit Plan, Kevin Stone, The John F. Llewellyn Living Trust, Nicholas H. Werthman, Floyd C. Sanger, Jr., Richard Askin, Wedbush Securities Inc., S Keating Rhoads, San Francisco & County Employees' Retirement System, FBO Dunaway Family Trust U/A/D, Schwab Fundamental US Large Company Index Fund, catherine a. verdusco, as trustee of the Benjamin J. verdusco trust u/a dtd, Catholic Healthcare West CHW, The Stephanie Murray Living Trust, City Employees' Retirement System of the City of Los Angeles, james G. Up De Graff, as trustee of the James G. Up de Graff Trust U/A, Samuel S. Moore Trust U/A DTD, Bernard Osher, as Trustee of the Floyd C. Sanger Jr. Trust U/A, John A. Orb Jr., Phillip B. Chase Revocable Trust dated, Nancy D. Ramage, Willow Creek Offshore Fund, Farmers Group, Inc., Bernard Osher, as Trustee of Bernard Osher 2006 Charitable Ramainder Unitrust #2, Margaret U. Miller, Artis Aggressive Growth LP, Carl Zlatchin, Mark Domas, Patricia H. Yeomans, Reinhold Weege, The Renee H. Miller Living Trust, THE JAMES G. UP DE GRAFF TRUST U/A, Artis Partners 2x (Institutional) LP, Delaware Charter Guarantee & Trust, as Custodian of the Betty Zlatchin IRA, V Trader Pro LLC, The Kaszton Family Trust UAD, Paul Theodore Hammond, Thomas F Friedberg, Carl Zlatchin Profit Sharing Plan, The Trust by Antoinette B. Brumbaugh U/A Dated, Christopher Reilly, Irving Rabin, Directors Guild of America, Darell F. Kuenzler, Defendants' Executive Committee, Monumental Life Insurance Company, as Owner of Teamsters Separate Account, Mary E. Day, Intel Corporation, The Betty Beaird Living Trust US 10-APR-87, The Hammond Family Trust U/A/D, John M. Altman, Chase L. Leavitt, Ironworker Employees' Benefit Corporation, as Administrator of the California Ironworkers field pension trust, SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decommissioning Trust, betty Roeland, as trustee of the Betty H. Roeland Marital Trust, Kathleen B. Flynn, Donald Baron, As A Trustee of The Don & Irene Baron Family Trust 7B-251, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Nedra Plonski, The Herman R. Friedberg Revocable Trust, Retirement Board of the San Francisco Employees' Retirement System, Will K. Weinstein, Shirley Dichek, Cheryl R. Fox, Kiener LP, Donald M. Fetherolf, Jeanette M. Duggan, Olivia Jean Williams Designated Benefit Plan/TOD, Omers Pension Fund, Miriam A. Pawel, Artis Partners Ltd., Donavon Virgil Schuler, P. Chamberlain, William Osborn, Stephen D. Carver, Selena A. Spurgeon, as trustee of the Spurgeon Family trust uad, The Terril F. Cox & Lorraine M. Cox Trust U/A DTD, Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund, Genworth Financial Wealth Management, Stanford Management Company, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Guidemark Large Cap Value Fund, Thomas F. Friedberg, Teamsters Separate Account, The Christopher J. Appleby Trust U/A DTD, Bank of the West, The Schuler Trust, Santa Clara University, Stinehart Living Trust, Sylvia Gates Schuler, Jim Hicks & Co., Employee Profit-Sharing Plan, Jacqueline E. Autry, Charley Chunyu Lu & Biying Zhang Commercial Property, Dorothy Flibbert, as a Trustee of the Tommie L. Cordero Trust, John Doe as trustee of the automotive industries pension trust fund, John F. Llewellyn, Union Bank, N.A., Catherine A. Verdusco, The Bank of New YOrk Mellon, as trustee of PG&E Postretirement Medical Plan Trust, Biying Zhang, The Robert C. & nancy Lobdell Family Trust UA, Ronald E. Cann, Redbourn Partners Ltd., Artis Partners LP, MB Financial Bank, N.A., The Dalton Trust, Artis Aggressive Growth Master Fund LP, Kay Walsh, as trustee of 3502 U/W/O Minnette R. Eckhouse Trust, Robert J. Brookes, Board of Trustees of So Cal UFCWU and FE Jt Pension Trust Fund, The John Lanfranki & Virginia Lanfranki Trust, THE PETER J. FERNALD TRUST U/A, Tommie L. Cordero, Qualified CPUC Decom Master TR, The Bernard and Rena Shapiro Intervivos Trust A/C #1 Dated, Canyon Capital Advisors LLC, Richard Haigler, John Doe, The Joy Leichenger Trust, Elizabeth F. Redmond, Archdiocese of Los Angeles Lay Employee Pension Plan, Joseph M. Fee, Water and Power Employee's Ret. Disab. & Death Benefit Ins. Plan, Warren B. Williamson, Herbert Anthony Clark, Jr., Headwaters Holdings LLC, ETRADE Securities LLC, William Kaszton, John Doe, as trustee of the SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decommissioning Trust, Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV, The Lolita Wagner Living Trust U/A/D, The Francesca J. Verdusco Trust U/A DTD, U/A/D FBO The 2000 Peckham Family Trust, Crowell Weedon & Co., Javad Rassouli, Richard S. Arnold, the Askin Family Trust U/A dtd, George J. Peckham, Herbert G. Lau Profit Sharing QRP Participation, John Pritzker, Camilla Chandler Frost, George William Buck, The Sybil Jinx Robinson Separate Property Trust, The Marital Trust of the De Goldsmith Family Trust, Automobile Club of Southern California, The FBO Dunaway Family Trust U/A/d, Frances L. Cey, individually and as a Trustee of the Cey Living Trust, Susan Babcock, Chandis Securities Company, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., Harvey Mudd College, Chandler Trust No. 2, James A. Friedberg, Peter R. Marino, GPS Funds I, Transamerica Partners Portfolio (F/K/A Diversified Investors Portfolio), Schwab Total Stock Market Index Fund, The flick Family Revocable Trust U/A/D as Amended & Completely Restated, The Benjamin J. Verdusco Trust U/A DTD, Renee H. Miller, Roger Goodan, The Lucile McVey Dunn Trust U/A dtd, Oakmont Management, Jonathan Gary Keith, Eureka Options LLC, Southern California Edison Company Nuclear Facilities Qualified CPUC Decommissioning Master Trust, Frances L. Cey, Felix Tong, The William James Bell 1993 Trust U/A (Cash & Holding Account), Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Nancy L. Mac Donald, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Producer - Writers Guild of America Pension Trust, Laurie H. Weaver, Omers/AACP Investors II, L.P., The Ronald Cann Trust UAD, Bernard osher, as trustee of Bernard Osher Trust dated, Martha A. Bell, Irene Baron, As A Trustee of the Don & Irene Baron Family Trust 7b-251, Bodmas Capital Partners LP, Everything Medical, Inc., Gordon Chamberlain, Starbuck, Tisdale & Associates, Irving & Varda Rabin 1992 Revocable Trust, The Verna R. Harrah Trust Special Account DTD, Vern M. Strickler, Dorothy Flibbert, Lawrence H Burks, Verna R. Harrah, Mark I. Seiden, Schwab Investments, Douglas B. Stewart, Craig W. Dougherty, Jill E. Berube, PEPPERDINE UNIVERSITY, Michael W. Dunaway, Everest Re Group Ltd., Jill E. Eckhouse, Alvin Baum Jr. 1966 Trust, The Roman Catholic Archbiship of Los Angeles, a corporation sole, Daniel D. Pecaro, Directors Guild of America Producer Pension Trust, Rena Shapiro and The Weege Family Trust U/A
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Enhanced RAFI (R) US Large, L.P.(sued herein as Research Affiliates Fundamental Index LP), Cutler Group, LP, Carol E Newman, The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University and Cassandra Trading Group LLC
Interested Party: Estate of Robert D. Nelson and Joint Board of Trustees of the Southwest Carpenters Pension Trust, as Administrator of the Southwest Carpenters Pension Trust
Case Number: 1:2011cv09572
Filed: December 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332oc
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 684 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (8202 in 1:11-md-02296-DLC) Letter, filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wilmington Trust Company, Marc S. Kirschner, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Amy Christine Brown and Hal Neier terminated. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/18/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(jca)
October 28, 2019 Filing 683 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (8195 in 1:11-md-02296-DLC) Letter filed by Marc S. Kirschner. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court shall close these cases. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/25/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(jca)
February 28, 2019 Filing 682 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [6047 in 12-cv-2652-DLC] MOTION for Nicholas M. Kelley to Withdraw as Attorney For Defendant W.L. Putnam Prize Fund. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Nicolas M. Kelley terminated. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/28/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(jca)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 681 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (7770 in 1:11-md-02296-DLC) Letter filed by Marc S. Kirschner. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Deposition due by 5/15/2020.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(jca)
February 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Richard J. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
February 7, 2019 Filing 680 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:11-cv-04522-DLC; granting (7746) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Evan Robert Schnittman terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-DLC. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/7/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al. (jca)
January 30, 2019 Filing 679 DECLARATION of Evan Schnittman in Support re: (296 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 233 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03753-DLC, 201 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 122 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 303 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 61 in 1:13-cv-03750-DLC, 6019 in 1:12-cv-02652-DLC, 159 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 405 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 259 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 7746 in 1:11-md-02296-DLC, 230 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 298 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 374 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03738-DLC, 121 in 1:12-cv-06055-DLC, 194 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 282 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 211 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 175 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03752-DLC, 259 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 166 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 342 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03747-DLC, 246 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03739-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-03737-DLC, 130 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 149 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 120 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 855 in 1:12-cv-00064-DLC, 286 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 678 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 134 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 66 in 1:13-cv-03744-DLC, 61 in 1:13-cv-03743-DLC, 897 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 114 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 208 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 61 in 1:13-cv-03741-DLC, 162 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03748-DLC, 141 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 225 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 120 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 63 in 1:13-cv-03742-DLC, 290 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03749-DLC, 220 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 63 in 1:13-cv-03746-DLC, 298 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 218 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 264 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 186 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03751-DLC, 159 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 129 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 465 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 261 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 163 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 140 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 190 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03745-DLC, 125 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 152 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 386 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03740-DLC, 187 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03736-DLC) MOTION for Evan Schnittman to Withdraw as Attorney for defendant St. Barnabas Hospital & Braker Memorial Home Employees Custody.. Document filed by ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL & BRAKER MEMORIAL HOME EMPLOYEES CUSTODY. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(Schnittman, Evan)
January 30, 2019 Filing 678 MOTION for Evan Schnittman to Withdraw as Attorney for defendant St. Barnabas Hospital & Braker Memorial Home Employees Custody. Document filed by ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL & BRAKER MEMORIAL HOME EMPLOYEES CUSTODY.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(Schnittman, Evan)
January 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Pretrial Conference held on 1/14/2019. (Court Reporter Kristen Carannante) Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(gr)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 677 ORDER: A pretrial conference is scheduled for January 14, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street. The Court has received requests from counsel to participate in the conference by telephone. Accordingly, it is herebyORDERED that any party wishing to be heard at the conference must appear in person. Parties wishing only to listen to the conference by telephone may do so by calling (888) 363-4749 and entering access code 7185839. Overflow seating will be available in Courtroom 12B. Parties may order a transcript of the conference by contacting Southern District Reporters. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(gr)
January 10, 2019 Filing 676 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan Robert Schnittman on behalf of ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL & BRAKER MEMORIAL HOME EMPLOYEES CUSTODY. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(Schnittman, Evan)
October 24, 2018 Filing 675 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Stephen Leonard Ratner, New Attorney: Alan J. Stone, Address: Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP, 28 Liberty Street, New York, New York, USA 10005, 212-530-5285. Document filed by SG Americas Securities LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Stone, Alan)
September 25, 2018 Filing 674 MOTION for Matthew J. Latterner to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by The Bank of Nova Scotia.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Latterner, Matthew)
September 24, 2018 Filing 673 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Joseph Stone on behalf of The Bank of Nova Scotia. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Stone, Alan)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 672 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (456) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Asa Robison Danes terminated in case 1:11-cv-04538-RJS; granting (889) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Asa Robison Danes terminated in case 1:11-cv-04784-RJS; granting (7600) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Asa Robison Danes terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-RJS; granting (671) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Asa Robison Danes terminated in case 1:11-cv-09572-RJS; granting (5897) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Asa Robison Danes terminated in case 1:12-cv-02652-RJS. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/13/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 1:12-cv-02652-RJS (ne)
August 10, 2018 Filing 671 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Asa R. Danes to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by NICHOLAS H. WERTHMAN, Polly H. Howells, Eric D. Werthman, Jesse Werthman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 1:12-cv-02652-RJS(Danes, Asa) Modified on 8/14/2018 (db).
June 7, 2018 Filing 670 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Tom Van Arsdel, New Attorney: James Andrew Hinds, Jr. . Document filed by Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc. aka JC Clark Adaly Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Hinds, James)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 669 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (7367 in case 11-md-2296) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCES OF DAVID S. MORDKOFF AND REMOVAL FROM ELECTRONIC SERVICE LIST. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney David Steve Mordkoff terminated.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/24/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al. (ras) Modified on 4/25/2018 (ras).
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 668 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (635) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:11-cv-09572-RJS. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Mark David Kotwick terminated. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/20/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS (mro)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 667 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: granting #666 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Matthew R. Eslick is granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record in these actions and such withdrawal is effective immediately. Attorney Matthew R. Eslick terminated. (Docketed in 11md2296 and 11cv9572) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/16/2018) (ap)
March 15, 2018 Filing 666 MOTION for Matthew R. Eslick to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by George D Veon Trust U/A DTD 10/03/01. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eslick, Matthew)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting (7272) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (664) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that D. Ross Martin is granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record in these actions and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. (Attorney D. Ross Martin terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-RJS. Attorney D. Ross Martin terminated in case 1:11-cv-09572-RJS.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/6/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS. (ras)
March 6, 2018 Filing 664 MOTION for D. Ross Martin to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Artis Aggressive Growth LP, Artis Aggressive Growth Master Fund LP, Artis Capital Management LP, Artis Partners (Institutional) LP, Artis Partners 2X LP, Artis Partners 2x (Institutional) LP, Artis Partners 2x Ltd., Artis Partners LP, Artis Partners Ltd.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS(Martin, D.)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 663 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting (6989 in 1:11-md-2296) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court, having considered the motion seeking leave, pursuant to Local Rule 1.4, for Richard A. McGuirk to withdraw as counsel of record in the above-captioned cases (Case Nos. 11-md-02296-RJS and 11-cv-9572-RJS) for Defendants Derek Dalton, individually and as trustee of the 10/03/2007 Dalton Trust; Karen Dalton, individually and as trustee of the 10/03/2007 Dalton Trust; and the 10/03/2007 Dalton Trust, and it appearing to the Court that the relief requested is appropriate; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Richard A McGuirk is granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record in these actions and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. SO ORDERED. Attorney Richard Arthur McGuirk terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-RJS. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/27/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS (ras) Modified on 6/28/2017 (ras).
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 662 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting (6979 in 11-md-2296) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court, having considered the motion seeking leave, pursuant to Local Rule 1.4, for Rebecca Snavely Saelao to withdraw as counsel of record in the above captioned cases (Case Nos. 11-MD-02296-RJS, 11-cv-09572-RJS, and 11-cv-9593-RJS) for defendants Union Bank of California, N.A.; Fidelity Management Trnst Company, Custodian, Michael Muskal IRA Rollover; and Fidelity Management Trust Company, Custodian, Olivia Jean Williams IRA Rollover; and it appearing to the Court that the relief requested is appropriate; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Rebecca Snavely Saelao is granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record in these actions and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. Attorney Rebecca Snavely Saelao terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-RJS. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/11/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 1:11-cv-09593-RJS (ras) Modified on 5/11/2017 (ras). Modified on 5/11/2017 (ras).
April 26, 2017 Filing 661 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Paul Del Mauro on behalf of Delaware Charter G & T TTEE, Delaware Charter Guarantee & Trust Company, Delaware Guarantee & Trust Co., 1980 Charitable Lead Trust, Bank of America, N.A., Trustee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS(Del Mauro, Steven)
August 1, 2016 Filing 660 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Del Guercio on behalf of Everest Reinsurance (Bermuda) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Del Guercio, Anthony)
August 1, 2016 Filing 659 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Del Guercio on behalf of Everest Re Group Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Del Guercio, Anthony)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 658 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (213 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 329 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 151 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 657 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 312 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 234 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 176 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS) Letter re: Withdrawal of Counsel, filed by Marc S. Kirschner. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney James Philip Chou; James Philip Chou; James Philip Chou; James Philip Chou; James Philip Chou; James Philip Chou; James Philip Chou; James Philip Chou; James Philip Chou and James Philip Chou terminated. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/25/2015) (kko)
August 25, 2015 Filing 657 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from David M. Zensky dated August 25, 2015 re: Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Zensky, David)
June 24, 2015 Filing 656 NOTICE of FIRM NAME CHANGE. Document filed by Stephen D. Carver. (McCambridge, John)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 655 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF PARTIAL SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on re: (654 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 6596 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS) Notice of Substitution of Attorney,, filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/20/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS(ajs)
April 17, 2015 Filing 654 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP, New Attorney: Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP as counsel of record for Plaintiffs only as to claims against defendant Union Bank, N.A, Address:. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for the Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS(Lack, Robert)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 1.4: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Maile H. Solis and Joshua W. Mahoney are granted leave to withdraw from their representation of Stephen D. Carver in this action and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. Attorney Joshua W Mahoney and Maile Hitomi Solis terminated. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS(mro)
March 2, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney John R. McCambridge to RE-FILE Document #652 MOTION for Maile H. Solis and Joshua W. Mahoney to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw As Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 1.4. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. (db)
February 27, 2015 Filing 652 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Maile H. Solis and Joshua W. Mahoney to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw As Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 1.4. Document filed by Stephen D. Carver.(McCambridge, John) Modified on 3/2/2015 (db).
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 651 ORDER in case 1:11-cv-04522-RJS; granting (6483) Letter Application to Change Attorney Name on Roll. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/6/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al. (ajs)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 650 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL Alexander R. Bilus for Defendants Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income; Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.; Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian for Brent V. Woods IRARollover; Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian of the George William BuckSEP-IRA DTD 04108193; Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian of the Peter Marino IRARollover; Monumental Life Insurance Company; Monumental Life Insurance Company f/k/a Peoples Benefit Life InsuranceCompany; Monumental Life Insurance Company, as Owner of Teamsters SeparateAccount; Schwab 1000 Index Fund; Schwab Capital Trust; Schwab Fundamental US Large Company Index Fund; Schwab Investments; Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund; Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund (F/K/A Schwab Institutional Select S&P500 Fund); Schwab Total Stock Market Index Fund; Transamerica Blackrock Large Cap Value VP (F/K/A Transamerica T.Rowe Price Equity Income VP); Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value; Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios; Transamerica Partners Mid Value Portfolio (F/K/A Transamerica PartnersMid-Cap Value Portfolio F/K/A Diversified Investors Mid-Cap ValuePortfolio); Transamerica Partners Portfolio (F/K/A Diversified Investors Portfolio);and Transamerica Series Trust (F/K/A Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust). ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/5/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS(mro)
November 21, 2014 Filing 649 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Todd Steinberg on behalf of Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian for Brent V. Woods IRA Rollover, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian of the George William Buck SEP-IRA DTD 04/08/93, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian of the Peter Marino IRA Rollover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Monumental Life Insurance Company f/k/a Peoples Benfit Life Insurance Company, Monumental Life Insurance Company, as Owner of Teamsters Separate Account, Schwab 1000 Index Fund, Schwab Capital Trust, Schwab Fundamental US Large Company Index Fund, Schwab Investments, Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund, Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund (F/K/A Schwab Institutional Select S&P 500 Fund), Schwab Total Stock Market Index Fund, Transamerica Blackrock Large Cap Value VP (F/K/A Transamerica T. Rowe Price Equity Income VP), Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios, Transamerica Partners Mid Value Portfolio (F/K/A Transameirca Partners Mid-Cap Value Portfolio F/K/A Diversified Investors Mid-Cap Value Portfolio), Transamerica Partners Portfolio (F/K/A Diversified Investors Portfolio), Transamerica Series Trust (F/K/A Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS(Steinberg, Stuart)
November 21, 2014 Filing 648 SUGGESTION OF DEATH upon the record as to Monica K. Hinman on June 27, 2013 . Document filed by Monika K HinmanFiled In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Martin, Brendon)
September 18, 2014 Filing 647 NOTICE of Submission of Letter. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust). (Attachments: #1 Attachment)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Zensky, David)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 646 SUPPLEMENTAL CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION ANDPROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/28/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(cd)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 645 ORDER: Named Defendants Counsel may make any or all of its eleven proposed motions to dismiss, so long as the initial briefs are limited to a combined 250 pages. These initial briefs shall be submitted no later than Friday, May 23, 2014. The response briefs shall also be limited to a combined 250 pages, and shall be submitted no later than Monday, June 23, 2014. The reply briefs, if any, shall be limited to a combined 100 pages, and shall be submitted no later than Thursday, July 3, 2014. Shareholder Liaison Counsel is directed to file its proposed global motion to dismiss Count 1 on behalf of all 5,200 Shareholder Defendants. The initial brief shall be submitted no later than Friday, May 23, 2014, and shall be no longer than 40 pages. The response brief shall be submitted no later than Monday, June 23, 2014, and shall be no longer than 40 pages. The reply brief, if any, shall be submitted no later than Thursday, July 3, 2014, and shall be no longer than 15 pages. ( Motions due by 5/23/2014. Responses due by 6/23/2014. Replies due by 7/3/2014.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/24/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(cd)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 644 PROTECTIVE ORDER IN AID OF MEDIATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... The Court shall retain jurisdiction to interpret and enforce this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/18/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(cd)
March 7, 2014 Filing 643 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jennifer Lynn Zordani to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9431269. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cassandra Trading Group LLC, Cutler Group, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Motion)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Zordani, Jennifer) Modified on 3/7/2014 (wb).
February 28, 2014 Filing 642 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leland H. Chait on behalf of B H Gerald Rogers MD Ltd Employee Pension Trust U/A 07/01/84, B H Gerald Rogers, Trustee, Mary Sutliffe Loucks Trust Portfolio 835, Mary Sutliffe Loucks, Trustee, Ralph Loucks Trust, Ralph B Loucks, Trustee, Robert B Greene Jr Trust U/A 11/06/86, Robert B Greene Jr, Trustee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Chait, Leland)
February 28, 2014 Filing 641 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sabina Clorfeine on behalf of Sempra Energy Pension Master Trust, Sempra Energy, Trustee, Sempra Energy Pension Mstr Trst. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Clorfeine, Sabina)
February 28, 2014 Filing 640 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kurt E Wilson on behalf of Warren J. Eide. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Wilson, Kurt)
February 27, 2014 Filing 639 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sabina Clorfeine on behalf of SDG&E Nuc Facilities NQ CPUC Decom Master Trust For Songs, SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Clorfeine, Sabina)
February 27, 2014 Filing 638 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Thomas Boos on behalf of Okabena US Core Equity Fund, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Boos, Matthew) Modified on 3/10/2014 (lb).
February 27, 2014 Filing 637 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Thomas Boos on behalf of David R. Coggins, Jr. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Boos, Matthew) Modified on 3/10/2014 (lb).
February 18, 2014 Filing 636 DECLARATION of Mark D. Kotwick in Support re: (635 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS) MOTION for Mark D. Kotwick to Withdraw as Attorney.. Document filed by Bodmas Capital Partners LP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS(Kotwick, Mark)
February 18, 2014 Filing 635 MOTION for Mark D. Kotwick to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Bodmas Capital Partners LP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS(Kotwick, Mark)
February 13, 2014 Filing 634 MOTION for Richard J. Leamy, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9354696. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Claretian Missionaries Western Province Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Leamy, Richard)
February 5, 2014 Filing 633 MOTION for Brian E. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CATHOLIC UNITED INVESTMENT TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Martin, Brian)
January 21, 2014 Filing 632 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wayne T. Lamprey on behalf of Joseph M. Fee, J M FEE & ELIZABETH FEE REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, Nancy H Fee Trust U/A DTD 05/15/1998. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 1:12-cv-02652-RJS(Lamprey, Wayne)
January 21, 2014 Filing 631 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ellen Greenstone on behalf of MIRIAM A. PAWEL. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS(Greenstone, Ellen)
January 16, 2014 Filing 630 MOTION for Wayne T. Lamprey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9269559. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Joseph M. Fee, J M FEE & ELIZABETH FEE REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, Nancy H Fee Trust U/A DTD 05/15/1998. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS(Lamprey, Wayne)
January 15, 2014 Filing 629 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Arthur McGuirk on behalf of DALTON TRUST AGREEMENT, U/A DTD 10/03/2007, Derek M. Dalton, Karen E. Dalton. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS(McGuirk, Richard)
December 10, 2013 Filing 628 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Eric David Madden on behalf of BLACK DIAMOND ARBITRAGE OFFSHORE LTD. F/K/A BLACK DIAMOND ARBITRAGE OFFSHORE LDC, Black Diamond Arbitrage Offshore LDC, Black Diamond Arbitrage Offshore Ltd., Black Diamond Offshore Ltd., Carlson Capital LP. New Address: Reid Collins & Tsai LLP, 1601 Elm Street, Ste. 4900, Dallas, Texas, USA 75201, 214-420-8900. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Madden, Eric)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 627 ORDER granting (2932) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Scott Cameron Kessenick is granted leave to withdraw from his representation of the above named Defendants in this action and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/06/2013) Attorney Scott Cameron Kessenick terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-RJS Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS (ama)
December 5, 2013 Filing 626 MOTION for Scott Cameron Kessenick to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Motion of Withdraw of Counsel. Document filed by Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Charles Schwab & Co Inc., Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian for Brent V. Woods IRA Rollover, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian of the George William Buck SEP-IRA DTD 04/08/93, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian of the Peter Marino IRA Rollover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Monumental Life Insurance Company f/k/a Peoples Benfit Life Insurance Company, Monumental Life Insurance Company, on behalf of Separate Account L-23, sued herein as Monumental Life Insurance Co., as Owner of Teamsters Separate Account, Schwab 1000 Index Fund, Schwab Capital Trust, Schwab Fundamental US Large Company Index Fund, Schwab Investments, Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund, Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund (F/K/A Schwab Institutional Select S&P 500 Fund), Schwab Total Stock Market Index Fund, Transamerica Blackrock Large Cap Value VP (F/K/A Transamerica T. Rowe Price Equity Income VP), Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios, Transamerica Partners Mid Value Portfolio (F/K/A Transameirca Partners Mid-Cap Value Portfolio F/K/A Diversified Investors Mid-Cap Value Portfolio), Transamerica Partners Portfolio (F/K/A Diversified Investors Portfolio), Transamerica Series Trust (F/K/A Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust), Charles Schwab & Co., Inc, Monumental Life Insurance Company, as Owner of Teamsters Separate Account. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS(Doluisio, Michael)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 625 MASTER CASE ORDER NO.4: For the purpose of facilitating the efficient administration of these cases, including the preparation of a protocol for the future consideration of additional pre-answer motions to dismiss ("Phase Two Motions"), I and the Court having received submissions from Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel and Defendants' Liaison Counsel (after consultation with their Executive Committees) previously designated herein, it is further set forth within this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(rsh)
November 19, 2013 Filing 624 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PRO SE. by Joseph F. Kun. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(sc)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Rachel Sims dated 10/15/2013 re: Accordingly, I respectfully request that I be removed from the Court's electronic filing notifications for this action. I have been informed by the court clerk that I am required to make this application by letter to the Court. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/17/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(ama)
October 9, 2013 Filing 622 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Douglas J. Smillie, New Attorney: Kevin Kennedy, Address: Blake Kirchner, Symonds Larson, Kennedy and Smith, 535 Griswold, Suite 1432, Detroit, Michigan, USA 48226, 313-961-7321. Document filed by Timothy R. Kennedy. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Smillie, Douglas)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 621 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Eugene J. Geekie, Jr. of the law firm of Freeborn & Peters LLP hereby enters its appearance as proposed counsel for defendants Charles T. Brumback, Kimberly C. Brumback and Brumback Family, LLC, replacing Jeffrey David Eaton, Susan P. Persichilli and Louis T. DeLucia, of the law firm of Schiff Hardin LLP, who hereby withdraw as counsel of record for the heretofore named Defendants and shall have no further responsibility in this matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/07/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(ama)
September 27, 2013 Filing 620 CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order dated September 23, 2013, the Court concludes that Section 546(e) does not preempt the Individual Creditors SLCFC claims, but that Section 362(a)(1) nonetheless deprives the Individual Creditors of standing to avoid the same transactions that the Committee is simultaneously suing to avoid; Defendants motion to dismiss is therefore granted; accordingly, the cases listed in Exhibit A of the Memorandum and Order dated September 23, 2013 and this judgment are closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/27/13) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(ml)
August 23, 2013 Filing 619 DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
August 23, 2013 Filing 618 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 617 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 616 DECLARATION of Jay Teitelbaum in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 615 DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 614 MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order), #2 Exhibit B (Schedule of Avoidance Actions))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 16, 2013 Filing 613 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Neal R. Troum, New Attorney: Joseph T. Kelleher, Address: Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP, 30 Valley Stream Parkway, Malvern, PA, USA 19355, (215) 564-8000. Document filed by Genworth Financial Wealth Management, Guidemark Large Cap Value Fund. (Kelleher, Joseph)
July 12, 2013 Filing 612 NOTICE of Letter. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
May 3, 2013 Filing 611 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Ranjit Mathoda served on 3/12/2013, answer due 4/2/2013. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER granting (2399) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 1:11-md-02296-RJS; granting (606) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 1:11-cv-09572-RJS;. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that William Kennedy Dodds is granted leave to withdraw from his representation of the above named Defendant in this action and that such withdrawal is effective immediately.(Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/10/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS(ama)
April 1, 2013 Filing 609 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Darell F. Kuenzler served on 2/23/2013, answer due 3/18/2013; John T. O'Loughlin served on 2/13/2013, answer due 3/6/2013. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
March 28, 2013 Filing 608 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Geoffrey Eric Marr on behalf of Gary E. Pekala (Marr, Geoffrey)
March 27, 2013 Filing 607 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Judge William H. Pauley, III is no longer assigned to the case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(sjo)
March 21, 2013 Filing 606 MOTION for William Kennedy Dodds to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Motion of Withdraw. Document filed by Monumental Life Insurance Co, Monumental Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Doluisio, Michael)
March 20, 2013 Filing 605 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE pro se of Richard T. Yu. (sc)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER APPROVING PROTOCOL GOVERNING RETENTION AND DISCOVERY OF DOCUMENTS HELD BY COURT-APPOINTED EXAMINER, KENNETH N. KLEE, ESQ. It is ORDERED as follows: The Protocol Governing Retention and Discovery of Documents Held by Court-Appointed Examiner, Kenneth N. Klee, Esq. attached hereto as Exhibit A is APPROVED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/15/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(rjm)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' THIRD OMNIBUS MOTION TO ENLARGE THE TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINTS: granting (323) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04522-WHP; granting (391) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04538-WHP; granting (765) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04784-WHP; granting (125) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04900-WHP; granting (69) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-05136-WHP; granting (2166) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP; granting (215) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09319-WHP; granting (170) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09406-WHP; granting (132) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09407-WHP; granting (291) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09409-WHP; granting (90) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09408-WHP; granting (139) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09410-WHP; granting (159) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09510-WHP; granting (147) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09511-WHP; granting (128) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09512-WHP; granting (164) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09514-WHP; granting (76) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09515-WHP; granting (232) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09568-WHP; granting (135) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09569-WHP; granting (202) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09570-WHP; granting (579) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09572-WHP; granting (196) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09592-WHP; granting (99) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09591-WHP; granting (132) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09589-WHP; granting (162) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09588-WHP; granting (220) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09590-WHP; granting (95) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09600-WHP; granting (76) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09599-WHP; granting (222) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09598-WHP; granting (111) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09597-WHP; granting (68) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09596-WHP; granting (197) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09595-WHP; granting (83) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09594-WHP; granting (155) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09593-WHP; granting (71) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09587-WHP; granting (259) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09586-WHP; granting (88) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09585-WHP; granting (108) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09581-WHP; granting (188) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09582-WHP; granting (126) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09584-WHP; granting (241) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09583-WHP; granting (239) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09571-WHP; granting (328) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00061-WHP; granting (228) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00063-WHP; granting (107) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00062-WHP; granting (223) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00065-WHP; granting (706) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00064-WHP; granting (109) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00549-WHP; granting (100) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00550-WHP; granting (165) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00551-WHP; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00552-WHP; granting (114) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00554-WHP; granting (185) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00555-WHP; granting (755) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-02652-WHP; granting (65) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-04539-WHP; granting (10) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-06055-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (82) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (52) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (52) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (25) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (80) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (13) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (112) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (191) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (110) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (359) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04538-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (446) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (81) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (148) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (111) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (200) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (40) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (80) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (122) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (178) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (42) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (183) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (57) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (18) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (181) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; grant
February 22, 2013 Filing 602 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ironworker Employees' Benefit Corporation, as Administrator of the California Ironworkers field pension trust waiver sent on 1/16/2013, answer due 3/18/2013. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 601 SCHEDULING ORDER: The oral argument scheduled for March 1, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. on the Phase One Motions to Dismiss and on the Tendering PHONES Holders' Motion to Intervene as Plaintiffs is adjourned to April 26, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. (Oral Argument set for 4/26/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III). (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(pl)
February 6, 2013 Filing 600 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael L. Klein on behalf of David Frank & Wayne C. Frank Trust UA 12/13/89 HC 31 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Klein, Michael)
February 5, 2013 Filing 599 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Neubauer on behalf of Darell F. Kuenzler Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Neubauer, Mark)
February 4, 2013 Filing 598 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (106 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 180 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 94 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 587 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 124 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 102 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 150 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 141 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 215 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 219 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 314 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 189 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 64 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 116 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 711 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 63 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 78 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 57 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 103 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 135 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 94 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 146 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 66 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 233 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 157 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 269 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 208 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 122 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 187 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 296 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 1670 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 104 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 218 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 542 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 369 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 206 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 101 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
February 4, 2013 Filing 597 DECLARATION of David C. Bohan in Support re: (106 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 180 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 94 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 587 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 124 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 102 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 150 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 141 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 215 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 219 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 314 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 189 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 64 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 116 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 711 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 63 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 78 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 57 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 103 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 135 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 94 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 146 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 66 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 233 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 157 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 269 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 208 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 122 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 187 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 296 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 1670 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 104 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 218 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 542 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 369 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 206 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 101 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
February 1, 2013 Filing 596 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meghan E George on behalf of JonesTrading Institutional Services LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(George, Meghan)
February 1, 2013 Filing 595 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Jones & Associates, Inc. for JonesTrading Institutional Services LLC, JonesTrading Institutional Services LLC. Document filed by JonesTrading Institutional Services LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Hurst, Brian)
February 1, 2013 Filing 594 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian J Hurst on behalf of JonesTrading Institutional Services LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Hurst, Brian)
January 30, 2013 Filing 593 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Joseph Olecki on behalf of Mark Stranahan, Mark Stranahan Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Olecki, Michael)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 592 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court having received the attached letter request of Citadel Equity Fund Ltd., Camden Asset Management LP, and certain of their affiliates (collectively, the "Tendering PHONES Holders") to file a motion to intervene as plaintiffs in this multidistrict litigation, dated November 13,2012, the following briefing schedule is entered: As set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/29/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama)
January 25, 2013 Filing 591 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of Robert J. Brookes, Robert J. Brookes, V.M. Brookes Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Schneider, Marc)
January 25, 2013 Filing 590 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Carl Zlatchin Profit Sharing Plan served on 1/6/2013, answer due 1/28/2013. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
January 23, 2013 Filing 589 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bodmas Capital Partners LP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Kotwick, Mark)
January 22, 2013 Filing 588 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Dorothy Flibbert served on 12/16/2012, answer due 1/7/2013; The J&M Trust UA Dated 7/23/1992 served on 12/18/2012, answer due 1/8/2013; Betty H. Roeland served on 12/15/2012, answer due 1/7/2013. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
January 18, 2013 Filing 587 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Substitution of Party, Counsel, and Liaison Counsel [Docket No.2179], Notice of Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints [Docket No. 2166], Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion [Docket No.2170], Declaration of David Zensky [Docket No. 2167], Declaration of Jay Teitelbaum, Esq. [Docket No. 2168] and Declaration of James S. Green, Jr. [Docket No. 2169[ on 1/11/13. Service was made by ECF and Mail. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 17, 2013 Filing 586 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark David Kotwick on behalf of Bodmas Capital Partners LP (Kotwick, Mark)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER: The Court having considered the motion seeking leave, pursuant to Local Rule 1.4, for Mark P. DiPerna to withdraw as counsel for the following named Defendants in the above-referenced Action: Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income; Charles Schwab &. Co., Inc; Monumental Life Insurance Co.; Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios; and Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value f/k/a Diversified Investors Portfolios (now known as Transamerica Partners Mid Value Portfolio). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Mark P. DiPerna is granted leave to withdraw from his representation of the above named Defendants in this action and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/4/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(mro)
January 11, 2013 Filing 583 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 10 in 1:12-cv-06055-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Filing 582 DECLARATION of James S. Green, Jr. in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 10 in 1:12-cv-06055-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Filing 581 DECLARATION of Jay Teitelbaum in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 10 in 1:12-cv-06055-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Filing 580 DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Filing 579 MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order), #2 Exhibit B (Schedule of Avoidance Actions))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Filing 578 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paige E. Barr on behalf of Irene Baron, JAMES G UP DE GRAFF TRUST U/A 01/15/04, Selena A. Spurgeon, as trustee of the Spurgeon Family trust uad 10/19/92, THE SPURGEON FAMILY TRUST UAD 10-19-92, The Spurgeon Family Trust UAD 10/19/92, james G. Up De Graff, as trustee of the James G. Up de Graff Trust U/A 01/15/04 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Barr, Paige)
January 11, 2013 Filing 577 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paige E. Barr on behalf of Donald Baron, The James G. Up De Gradd Trust U/A 01/15/04 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(Barr, Paige)
January 11, 2013 Filing 576 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Charles Bohan on behalf of Donald Baron, As A Trustee of The Don & Irene Baron Family Trust 7B-251, THE JAMES G. UP DE GRAFF TRUST U/A 01/15/04 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(Bohan, David)
January 11, 2013 Filing 575 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Charles Bohan on behalf of Irene Baron, As A Trustee of the Don & Irene Baron Family Trust 7b-251, Selena A. Spurgeon, as trustee of the Spurgeon Family trust uad 10/19/92, The Spurgeon Family Trust UAD 10/19/92, james G. Up De Graff, as trustee of the James G. Up de Graff Trust U/A 01/15/04 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Bohan, David)
January 10, 2013 Filing 574 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Libicki on behalf of Ironworker Employees' Benefit Corporation, as Administrator of the California Ironworkers field pension trust (Libicki, Stuart)
January 10, 2013 Filing 573 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Neubauer on behalf of Jim Hicks, as Trustee of the Jim Hicks & Co. Employee Profit-Sharing Plan Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Neubauer, Mark)
January 8, 2013 Filing 572 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Michael Ahron on behalf of Board of Directors of the Producer - Writer Guild of America Pension Plan, Producer - Writers Guild of America Pension Trust (Ahron, Stephen)
January 8, 2013 Filing 571 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Steve Mordkoff on behalf of Board of Directors of the Producer - Writer Guild of America Pension Plan, Producer - Writers Guild of America Pension Trust (Mordkoff, David)
January 8, 2013 Filing 570 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Board of Directors of the Producer - Writer Guild of America Pension Plan, Producer - Writers Guild of America Pension Trust.(Ratner, Stephen)
January 8, 2013 Filing 569 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Leonard Ratner on behalf of Board of Directors of the Producer - Writer Guild of America Pension Plan, Producer - Writers Guild of America Pension Trust (Ratner, Stephen)
January 7, 2013 Filing 568 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Neubauer on behalf of Robert N. Mohr, Successor Trustee to Joseph B. Mohr (erroneously named as Joseph B. Mohn), as Trustee of the J&M Trust UA Dated 07/23/1992 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Neubauer, Mark)
January 2, 2013 Filing 567 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Doluisio on behalf of Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian for Brent V. Woods IRA Rollover, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian of the George William Buck SEP-IRA DTD 04/08/93, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian of the Peter Marino IRA Rollover, Monumental Life Insurance Company f/k/a Peoples Benfit Life Insurance Company, Monumental Life Insurance Company, on behalf of Separate Account L-23, sued herein as Monumental Life Insurance Co., as Owner of Teamsters Separate Account, Schwab 1000 Index Fund, Schwab Capital Trust, Schwab Fundamental US Large Company Index Fund, Schwab Investments, Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund, Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund (F/K/A Schwab Institutional Select S&P 500 Fund), Schwab Total Stock Market Index Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Doluisio, Michael)
January 2, 2013 Filing 566 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Bilus on behalf of Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian for Brent V. Woods IRA Rollover, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian of the George William Buck SEP-IRA DTD 04/08/93, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian of the Peter Marino IRA Rollover, Monumental Life Insurance Company f/k/a Peoples Benfit Life Insurance Company, Monumental Life Insurance Company, on behalf of Separate Account L-23, sued herein as Monumental Life Insurance Co., as Owner of Teamsters Separate Account, Schwab 1000 Index Fund, Schwab Capital Trust, Schwab Fundamental US Large Company Index Fund, Schwab Investments, Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund, Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund (F/K/A Schwab Institutional Select S&P 500 Fund), Schwab Total Stock Market Index Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Bilus, Alexander)
January 2, 2013 Filing 565 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Cameron Kessenick on behalf of Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian for Brent V. Woods IRA Rollover, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian of the George William Buck SEP-IRA DTD 04/08/93, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. as Custodian of the Peter Marino IRA Rollover, Monumental Life Insurance Company f/k/a Peoples Benfit Life Insurance Company, Monumental Life Insurance Company, on behalf of Separate Account L-23, sued herein as Monumental Life Insurance Co., as Owner of Teamsters Separate Account, Schwab 1000 Index Fund, Schwab Capital Trust, Schwab Fundamental US Large Company Index Fund, Schwab Investments, Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund, Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund (F/K/A Schwab Institutional Select S&P 500 Fund), Schwab Total Stock Market Index Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Kessenick, Scott)
December 31, 2012 Filing 564 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Neubauer on behalf of TERRILL F COX & LORRAINE M COX TRUST U/A DTD 3/31/98 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Neubauer, Mark)
December 26, 2012 Filing 585 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Mike Eugene Abernethy, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(rdz)
December 21, 2012 Filing 563 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
December 21, 2012 Filing 562 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Steven Ulrich on behalf of Alvin Baum Jr. 1966 Trust (Ulrich, Kenneth)
December 21, 2012 Filing 561 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Carl Zlatchin served on 12/13/2012, answer due 1/3/2013; Alvin Baum Jr. 1966 Trust served on 12/13/2012, answer due 1/3/2013; Gwendolyn G. Babcock served on 12/5/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; Board of Trustees of the Directors Guild of America - Producer Pension Plan, As Administrator of the Directors Guild of America -Producer Pension Plan Basic Benefit Plan served on 12/5/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; Kay Walsh served on 12/5/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; Jim Hicks & Co., Employee Profit-Sharing Plan served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; Jim Hicks served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; Steven U. Lee served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; Jung E. Lee served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; Christopher Reilly served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013; Farmers Group, Inc. served on 12/5/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; WILSHIRE 5000 INDEX FUND served on 12/4/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; Wilshire Mutual Funds, Inc. served on 12/4/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; Wilshire Variable Insurance Trust served on 12/4/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; Board of Trustees of the Southern California United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Food Employers Joint Pension Trust Fund served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; Los Angeles City Employees' Retirement System served on 12/5/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; Board of Administration of the Los Angeles City Employees' Retirement System served on 12/5/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; Board of Directors of the Producer - Writer Guild of America Pension Plan served on 12/5/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; Retirement Board of the San Francisco Employees' Retirement System served on 12/13/2012, answer due 1/3/2013; JONESTRADING INSTITUTIONAL SERVICES LLC served on 12/5/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; Joshua Tree Capital Management LP served on 12/13/2012, answer due 1/3/2013; The Miller Family Trust served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013; Margaret U. Miller served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013; PEPPERDINE UNIVERSITY served on 12/5/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; ALLEGRO ASSOCIATES served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013; Bodmas Capital Partners LP served on 12/13/2012, answer due 1/3/2013; The Marital Trust of the De Goldsmith Family Trust served on 12/5/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; Craig W. Dougherty served on 12/5/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; Headwaters Holdings LLC served on 12/13/2012, answer due 1/3/2013; V Trader Pro LLC served on 12/13/2012, answer due 1/3/2013; Willow Creek Capital Partners served on 12/13/2012, answer due 1/3/2013; Willow Creek Offshore Fund served on 12/13/2012, answer due 1/3/2013; the Survivors' Trust served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; The Terril F. Cox & Lorraine M. Cox Trust U/A DTD 3/31/98 served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
December 18, 2012 Filing 560 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel G. Jarcho on behalf of Glen W Bell, Jr, Glen W. Bell, Martha A. Bell, Kathleen B. Flynn Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(Jarcho, Daniel)
December 18, 2012 Filing 559 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ira M. Levee on behalf of Joint Board of Trustees of the Southwest Carpenters Pension Trust, as Administrator of the Southwest Carpenters Pension Trust Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Levee, Ira)
December 11, 2012 Filing 558 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Libicki on behalf of Board of Trustees of So Cal UFCWU and FE Jt Pension Trust Fund (Libicki, Stuart)
December 7, 2012 Filing 557 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by D. Ross Martin on behalf of Artis Aggressive Growth LP, Artis Aggressive Growth Master Fund LP, Artis Capital Management LP, Artis Partners (Institutional) LP, Artis Partners 2X LP, Artis Partners 2x (Institutional) LP, Artis Partners 2x Ltd., Artis Partners LP, Artis Partners Ltd. (Martin, D.)
December 7, 2012 Filing 556 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The Survivors' Trust CR 9/30/01 UA Charles R. & Elizabeth F. Redmond Trust DTD 5/20/87 waiver sent on 11/26/2012, answer due 1/25/2013; Elizabeth F. Redmond waiver sent on 11/26/2012, answer due 1/25/2013. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
December 7, 2012 Filing 555 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Donald M. Fetherolf waiver sent on 11/7/2012, answer due 1/7/2013. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
December 7, 2012 Filing 554 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. SJC CAPITAL LLC waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Sharon H. Boultinghouse waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Sharon L. Boultinghouse Trust waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
December 7, 2012 Filing 553 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Marilyn N. Fetherolf waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; The Fetherolf Family Trust waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Artis Partners 2x (Institutional) LP waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Artis Partners (Institutional) LP waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Artis Aggressive Growth Master Fund LP waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Artis Aggressive Growth LP waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Artis Partners 2x Ltd. waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Artis Partners Ltd. waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Artis Partners 2X LP waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Artis Partners LP waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Cheryl R. Fox waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Artis Capital Management LP waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
December 6, 2012 Filing 552 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell Jan Banas, Jr on behalf of Carol E Newman Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Banas, Mitchell)
November 30, 2012 Filing 551 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. GPS Funds I waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Canyon Capital Advisors LLC waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Canyon Value Realization Fund, L.P. waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Coastview Equity Partners waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
November 20, 2012 Filing 550 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Kyung Kim on behalf of Elizabeth F. Redmond (Kim, Laura)
November 20, 2012 Filing 549 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Susan H. Shane waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; Ronald E. Cann waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; The Ronald Cann Trust UAD 11-22-04 waiver sent on 10/3/2012, answer due 12/3/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 548 INDIVIDUAL CREDITOR PLAINTIFF'S OMNIBUS SCHEDULE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and paragraph 13 of Master Case Order No.3 [Docket No. 1395], Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Exchangeable Notes commonly referred to as the PHONES notes (collectively, the "Note Holder Plaintiffs"), and Plaintiffs William A. Niese et al. (the "Retiree Plaintiffs" and, together with the Note Holder Plaintiffs, the "Individual Creditor Plaintiffs") hereby give notice that they have dismissed the actions listed below without prejudice solely against the corresponding defendants listed below (collectively, the "Paragraph 13 Dismissed Defendants"): For the avoidance of doubt, and pursuant to paragraph 13 of Master Case Order No.3, such dismissals shall be without prejudice to: (i) each Paragraph 13 Dismissed Defendant's inclusion in the putative class of defendants; and (ii) the Individual Creditor Plaintiffs' ability to reassert claims against any Paragraph 13 Dismissed Defendant as a named defendant if subsequent information later reveals that any such Paragraph 13 Dismissed Defendant received greater than $100,000 in Shareholder Transfers. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/09/2012) (ama)
November 9, 2012 Filing 546 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by SJC CAPITAL LLC.(Mordkoff, David)
November 9, 2012 Filing 545 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Steve Mordkoff on behalf of SJC CAPITAL LLC (Mordkoff, David)
November 6, 2012 Filing 544 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (i) Motion To Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6), And The Exhibit Thereto, And (ii) Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion, And The Exhibit Thereto on 11/6/2012. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
November 6, 2012 Filing 543 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
November 6, 2012 Filing 542 MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. Responses due by 12/21/2012 Return Date set for 3/1/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
November 5, 2012 Filing 547 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Kevin Stone, IRA Rollover (djc)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Steven R. Schoenfeld dated 10/24/2012 re: I request that the Court so order the substitution of Robinson & Cole LLP for Dorsey & Whitney LLP with respect to my role as a member of the Defendants' Executive Committees under Master Case Order No. 3. The enclosed notice of the submission of this letter requesting this change has been sent to all counsel via ECF filing in 12 MC 2296. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/26/2012). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al. Docket entry to be made in 12mc2296, 11md2296 and member cases as per Chambers. (rjm)
November 2, 2012 Filing 540 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Transamerica Partners Portfolio (F/K/A Diversified Investors Portfolio).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Doluisio, Michael)
November 2, 2012 Filing 539 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Transamerica Series Trust (F/K/A Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Doluisio, Michael)
November 2, 2012 Filing 538 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Transamerica Partners Mid Value Portfolio (F/K/A Transameirca Partners Mid-Cap Value Portfolio F/K/A Diversified Investors Mid-Cap Value Portfolio).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Doluisio, Michael)
November 2, 2012 Filing 537 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Transamerica Blackrock Large Cap Value VP (F/K/A Transamerica T. Rowe Price Equity Income VP).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Doluisio, Michael)
November 1, 2012 Filing 536 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Doluisio on behalf of Transamerica Blackrock Large Cap Value VP (F/K/A Transamerica T. Rowe Price Equity Income VP), Transamerica Partners Mid Value Portfolio (F/K/A Transameirca Partners Mid-Cap Value Portfolio F/K/A Diversified Investors Mid-Cap Value Portfolio), Transamerica Partners Portfolio (F/K/A Diversified Investors Portfolio), Transamerica Series Trust (F/K/A Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Doluisio, Michael)
November 1, 2012 Filing 535 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Cameron Kessenick on behalf of Transamerica Blackrock Large Cap Value VP (F/K/A Transamerica T. Rowe Price Equity Income VP), Transamerica Partners Mid Value Portfolio (F/K/A Transameirca Partners Mid-Cap Value Portfolio F/K/A Diversified Investors Mid-Cap Value Portfolio), Transamerica Partners Portfolio (F/K/A Diversified Investors Portfolio), Transamerica Series Trust (F/K/A Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Kessenick, Scott)
November 1, 2012 Filing 534 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Bilus on behalf of Transamerica Blackrock Large Cap Value VP (F/K/A Transamerica T. Rowe Price Equity Income VP), Transamerica Partners Mid Value Portfolio (F/K/A Transameirca Partners Mid-Cap Value Portfolio F/K/A Diversified Investors Mid-Cap Value Portfolio), Transamerica Partners Portfolio (F/K/A Diversified Investors Portfolio), Transamerica Series Trust (F/K/A Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Bilus, Alexander)
October 26, 2012 Filing 533 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shauna R. Prewitt on behalf of Enrique Hernandez, Jr, William A Osborn, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., William Osborn Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Prewitt, Shauna)
October 26, 2012 Filing 532 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Thomas Manning on behalf of Enrique Hernandez, Jr, William A Osborn, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., William Osborn Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Manning, Jason)
October 26, 2012 Filing 531 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donna L. McDevitt on behalf of Enrique Hernandez, Jr, William A Osborn, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., William Osborn Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(McDevitt, Donna)
October 26, 2012 Filing 530 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew R. Kipp on behalf of Enrique Hernandez, Jr, William A Osborn, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., William Osborn Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Kipp, Matthew)
October 22, 2012 Filing 529 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 528 PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and paragraph 13 of Master Case Order NO. 3 [Docket No. 1395], Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Exchangeable Notes commonly referred to as the PHONES notes (collectively, the "Plaintiffs"), hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against each of the defendants listed below (collectively, the "Paragraph 13 Dismissed Defendants"): Robert Edward Bellack; Marcia Finch Cannell; Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., as Custodian of The Olivia Jean Williams IRA Rollover;* The Epstein Family Revocable Trust; and John Doe, as Trustee of The Epstein Family Revocable Trust. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/15/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(lmb)
October 15, 2012 Filing 527 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by City Employees' Retirement System of the City of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles Fire and Police Pension Plan.(D'Agostino, Michael)
October 15, 2012 Filing 526 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael C. D'Agostino on behalf of City Employee's Retirement System of the City of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles Fire and Police Pension Plan, City Employees' Retirement System of the City of Los Angeles Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael)
October 1, 2012 Filing 525 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #386 Amended Complaint, against #502 U/W/O Minnette R. Eckhouse Trust, Betty Ann Altman, John M. Altman, Jeffrey J. Appleby, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, Archdiocese of Los Angeles Lay Employee Pension Plan, Richard S. Arnold, Carol Askin, Richard Askin, Askin Family Trust, Automobile Club of Southern California, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Jacqueline E. Autry, Susan Babcock, Donald Baron, Irene Baron, Betty Beaird, Sharron R. Beard, Spencer W. Beard, Glen W. Bell, Martha A. Bell, William J. Bell, Bernard Osher 2006 Charitable Remainder Unitrust #2, Bernard and Barbro Osher 2006 Charitable Remainder Unitrust #2, Jill E. Berube, Blue Cross of California, Board of Administration of the Water and Power Employees' Retirement Plan, incorrectly named as "Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV" and "Water, Board of Administration of the Water and Power Employees' Retirement Plan, incorrectly named as "Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV" and "Water, Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Jr University, Florence S. Bradshaw(an individual), Florence S. Bradshaw, Brandes Investment Partners L.P., Sherry P. Broder(an individual), Sherry P. Broder(individually and as a Trustee of Sherry P. Broder U/A DTD 1/1/94), Robert J. Brookes, Robert J. Brookes, Antoinette B. Brumbaugh, George William Buck(individually and as a Trustee of UTA Charles Schwab & Co. Inc. SEP-IRA DTD 4/8/93), George William Buck, Lawrence H. Burks, Lawrence H Burks, California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust, California Physicians' Service D/B/A Blue Shield California, Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Carpenters Pension Trust for Northern California, Catholic Healthcare West CHW, Gordon Chamberlain, P. Chamberlain, Chandis Securities Company, Jeffrey Chandler, Chandler Trust No. 1, Chandler Trust No. 2, Eric I. Chang, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charley Chunyu Lu & Biying Zhang Commercial Property, City Employees' Retirement System of the City of Los Angeles, City National Bank, City of Los Angeles Fire and Police Pension Plan, Herbert Anthony Clark, Jr., Sally H. Contant, Tommie L. Cordero, Crowell Weedon & Co., Cutler Group LP, Derek M. Dalton, Karen E. Dalton, Mary E. Day, Dennis Eugene De Haas, Declaration of Bell Family Trust Meadowbrooks Equity Fund UA 12/1/86, Declaration of Bell Family Trust UA 12/1/86, Delaware Charter Guarantee & Trust Company(as Custodian of Carl Zlatchin Profit), Delaware Charter Guarantee & Trust, as Custodian of the Betty Zlatchin IRA, Daryl V. Dichek, Shirley Dichek, Directors Guild of America Producer Pension Trust, John Doe, Doheney Eye Institute, Mark Domas, Francis G. Duggan, Jeanette M. Duggan, Michael W. Dunaway, Trudy V. Dunaway, Lucile M. Dunn, ETRADE Securities LLC, James H. Eckhouse, Jill E. Eckhouse, Warren J. Eide, Elizabeth G. Chamberlain Trust U/A DTD 4/25/1979, Enhanced RAFI (R) US Large, L.P.(sued herein as Research Affiliates Fundamental Index LP), Eureka Options LLC, Everything Medical, Inc., Joseph M. Fee, Peter J. Fernald, Bernadette Fingleton, First Republic Bank, John E. Flick, Lois L. Flick, Kathleen B. Flynn, James A. Friedberg, Thomas F Friedberg, Thomas F. Friedberg, Robert Friedman, GCW Capital LLC, Gamma Phi Beta Foundation, Gamma Phi Beta Foundation, Inc., Genworth Financial Wealth Management, Rodolfo V. Gil, Helen Grossman, Guidemark Large Cap Value Fund, Despina Haigler, Richard Haigler, Karen Hammond, Paul Theodore Hammond, Verna R. Harrah, Vyvian Heath, Herbert G. Lau Profit Sharing QRP Participation, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., E. Donald Heymann, E. Donald Heymann(individually and as a Trustee of E. Donald Heymann Trust), Leonard F. Hill, Danica F. Hughes, Mark A. Hughes, Intel Corporation, Mark Allen Itkin, Nancy Fay Johnson, Omar F. Johnson Jr., Jupiter Capital Partners LLC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plans and Hospital, Patricia Kaszton, William Kaszton, Jonathan Gary Keith, Joe Youssry Kelada, Kiener LP, John Lanfranki, Virginia Lanfranki, Chase L. Leavitt, John F. Llewellyn, Nancy Lobdell, Robert C. Lobdell, Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV, Charley Chunyu Lu, MC Investment Partners LLC, Nancy L. Mac Donald, William D. Mac Donald, Iris B. Mahoney, Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of U/W/O Paul P Mahoney DTD 12/28/1978), Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of the Iris B. Mahoney REV TR U/A/D 04/10/98), Peter R. Marino, Marilyn M. Matheson, Irene M. McNulty, Alfred W. Merkel, Marlowe G. Merkel, Renee H. Miller, Laurie Mitchell, Durham J. Monsma, Robbie E. Monsma, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Samuel S. Moore, Eric Morris, Stephanie Murray, Robert D. Nelson, Aviv Nevo, Thomas B. O'Keefe, Ynez Viole O'Neill, Oakmont Management, Janice Fay Johnson Ochs, Omers Pension Fund, John A. Orb, William Osborn, Bernard Osher(individually, as a Trustee of the Bernard and Barbro Osher 2006 Charitable REM Unitrust #2, as a Trustee of the Bernard Osher 2006 Charitable Remainder Untrust #2, and as a Trustee of the Bernard Osher Trust U/A DTD 3/8/88), Bernard Osher(as Trustee of Bernard Osher 2006 Charitable Remainder Untrust #2), PG&E Postretirment Medical Plan TR, Miriam A. Pawel, Daniel D. Pecaro, Ofelia R. Pecaro, George J. Peckham, Imogene S. Peckham, Phillip B. Chase Revocable Trust dated 7/28/94, Michael Plonski, Nedra Plonski, John Pritzker, Lisa Pritzker, Producer - Writers Guild of America Pension Trust, Qualified CPUC Decom Master TR, RWB, Irving Rabin, Varda Rabin, Rabin Worldwide, Inc., Nancy D. Ramage, Gelert R. Ramage, Jr., Robert Ramsey, Javad Rassouli, Redbourn Partners Ltd., Remdel Brothers, Daniel H. Renberg, Carol Rhoads, S Keating Rhoads, Enzo S. Ricciardelli, Sybil Jinx Robinson, Roman Catholic Archbishop LA, Claude Rosenberg, Louise Rosenberg, SA Funds Investment Trust, SC Edison Nuclear Facilities, Sacramento County Emp Ret System, San Francisco & County Employees' Retirement System, San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co., Floyd C. Sanger, Jr, Joanne Desherow Sanger, Santa Barbara County Employees Retirement System, Santa Clara University, Donavon Virgil Schuler, Sylvia Gates Schuler, Mark I. Seiden, Susan H. Shane, Rena Shapiro, Southwest Carpenters Pension Trust, Starbuck, Tisdale & Associates, State of California - Mid Cap Value, State of California, Department of Personnel Administration, Savings Plus Plan, Douglas B. Stewart, Douglas B. Stewart(an individual), John W. Stewart II, John W. Stewart II, Patrick K. Stinehart, William Stinehart Jr.(individually and as a Trustee of Chandler Trust No. 1 and Chandler Trust No. 2), William Stinehart Jr.(an individual), Stinehart Living Trust, Kevin Stone, Vern M. Strickler, T.Rowe Price, THE PETER J. FERNALD TRUST U/A 1/13/92;, Lori Ann Talarico, Teamsters Separate Account, The 10/03/2007 Dalton Trust, The 12/09/90 Tommie L. Cordero Trust, The 3/10/87 Trust for the Benefit of R.J. Brookes & V.M. Brookes, The Alfred V. Tjarks Retirement Plan dtd 2/18/85, The Alfred W. Merkel Marlowe G. Merkel Trust, The Autry Community Property Trust Dated 3/14/1985, The Benjamin J. Verdusco Trust U/A DTD 12/13/89, The Bernard and Rena Shapiro Intervivos Trust A/C #1 Dated 10/15/87, The Betty Beaird Living Trust US 10-APR-87, The Betty H. Roeland Marital Trust, The Dichek Family Trust Dated 12/11/74, The Don & Irene Baron Family Trust 7B-251, The E. Donald Heymann Trust, The Felicity J. Appleby Trust U/A DTD 12/13/89, The Francesca J. Verdusco Trust U/A DTD 12/13/1989, The Friedman Living Trust U/A 08/04/99, The Hammond Family Trust U/A/D 2/11/88, The Helen Grossman Trust dated 9/8/99, The Herman R. Friedberg Revocable Trust, The Hill Revocable Living Trust DTD 12/24/91, The James F. Polk Trust U/A DTD 12/13/89, The John & Betty Altman Family Trust UAD 05/16/86, The John Lanfranki & Virginia Lanfranki Trust 4/29/80, The John Stewart Property Trust, The Joy Leichenger Trust, The Kaszton Family Trust UAD 10/23/97, The Lolita Wagner Living Trust U/A/D 10/07/88, The Margaret McKensie Living Trust U/A DTD 2/23/94, The Pecaro Family Trust DTD 4/12/02, The Richard Haigler & Despina Haigler Living Trust U/A 11/4/91, The Roeland Family Trust UA 8/19/86, The Rosenberg Revocable Trust, The Sally H. Contant Trust U/A DTD 10/13/83, The Schuler Trust, The Stephanie Murray Living Trust, The Sybil Jinx Robinson Separate Property Trust, The Tillman Family Trust U/A DTD 7/29/80, The Trust U/A DTD 11/07/94 for the Benefit of S. Keating and Carol Rhoads, The Trust by Antoinette B. Brumbaugh U/A Dated 10/05/94, The Trust for the Benefit of Sherry P. Broder U/A DTD 1/1/94, The Trust for the Benefit of Susan H. Shane, The U/A DTA 03/29/04 Joanne Desherow, The Weege Family Trust U/A 6/21/89, The Whittier Trust Company, The William D. MacDonald & Nancy L. MacDonald Trust U/A 7/21, The Woods/Mitchell Family Trust, The Yeomans Family Trust U/A 2/22/92, William F. Thomas, Eugene Tillman, Ina Tillman, Jonathan A. Tillman, Alfred V. Tjarks, Alfred V. Tjarks Jr., Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios, U/A/D 07/14/2000 FBO The 2000 Peckham Family Trust, Catherine A. Verdusco, Lolita K. Wagner, Lolita K. Wagner, Water and Power Employee's Ret. Disab. & Death Benefit Ins. Plan, Laurie H. Weaver, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Inc., Wedbush Securities Inc., Reinhold Weege, Shelley Weege, Will K. Weinstein, Weintraub Capital Management, L.P., Nicholas H. Werthman, Olivia Jean Williams, Warren B. Williamson, Diane Buchanan Wilsey(an individual), Brent V. Woods, Patricia H. Yeomans, Yield Strategies Fund I, LP, Peter A. Young, Richard T. Yu, Biying Zhang, Betty K Zlatchin, Betty K. Zlatchin, Carl Zlatchin, zoological Society of San Diego, a California, John Doe as trustee of the automotive industries pension trust fund Bernard Osher, as Trustee of Bernard Osher 2006 Charitable Ramainder Unitrust #2 Bernard osher, as trustee of Bernard Osher Trust dated 03/08/88 Bernard Osher Trust dated 03/08/88 Discretionary Account V.M. Brookes Ironworker Employees' Benefit Corporation, as Administrator of the California Ironworkers field pension t
October 1, 2012 Filing 524 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
September 27, 2012 Filing 523 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the PHONES notes, hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against defendant Wilshire Associates Inc., who has neither moved nor answered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 9/27/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(lmb)
September 27, 2012 Filing 522 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the PHONES notes, hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against defendant Bank of the West, who has neither moved nor answered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 9/27/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(lmb)
September 13, 2012 Filing 518 NOTICE of Notice of Filing and Service re: (1395 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1395 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, (1419 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James)
September 13, 2012 Filing 517 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Pleadings Relating to Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints re: (1370 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), (1364 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time For Service of Summonses and Complaints., (1367 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1366 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1365 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, (1368 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James)
September 12, 2012 Filing 516 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Geoffrey Paul Knudsen on behalf of Daryl V. Dichek, Shirley Dichek, The Dichek Family Trust Dated 12/11/74 (Knudsen, Geoffrey)
September 12, 2012 Filing 515 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Southern California Edison Company Nuclear Facilities Qualified CPUC Decommissioning Master Trust.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(Slome, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 514 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Richard Slome on behalf of Southern California Edison Company Nuclear Facilities Qualified CPUC Decommissioning Master Trust Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(Slome, Thomas)
September 10, 2012 Filing 513 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Mark P. DiPerna, New Attorney: Michael S. Doluisio, Alexander R. Bilus, Scott C. Kessenick, Address: Dechert LLP, 2929 Arch Street, Philadelphia, PA, 19104, 215-994-4000. Document filed by Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Charles Schwab & Co Inc., Charles Schwab & Co., Inc, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Doluisio, Michael)
September 6, 2012 Filing 521 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by CAROL LAU PHD PSP PART QRP Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(jfe)
September 6, 2012 Filing 520 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by HERBERT G. IAU PROFIT SHARING QRP PARTICIPATION Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(lmb)
September 5, 2012 Filing 519 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shira Weissman on behalf of Irving Rabin, Varda Rabin (js)
September 4, 2012 Filing 512 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard M. Carbonara on behalf of Ruanwil LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Carbonara, Richard)
September 4, 2012 Filing 511 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard M. Carbonara on behalf of Stanton R. Cook Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Carbonara, Richard)
August 31, 2012 Filing 510 NOTICE of Notice of Filing and Service of Pleading re: (1364 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time For Service of Summonses and Complaints., (1367 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1366 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1365 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, (1368 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James)
August 30, 2012 Filing 509 MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time For Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James)
August 28, 2012 Filing 508 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University.(Ericson, Bruce)
August 28, 2012 Filing 507 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce A. Ericson on behalf of The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University (Ericson, Bruce)
August 17, 2012 Filing 506 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
August 3, 2012 Filing 505 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Redbourn Partners Ltd. waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
August 3, 2012 Filing 504 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Autry Community Property Trust Dated 3/14/1985 served on 5/2/2012, answer due 5/23/2012; Robert Friedman served on 5/2/2012, answer due 5/23/2012; The Friedman Living Trust U/A 08/04/99 served on 5/2/2012, answer due 5/23/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
July 26, 2012 Filing 503 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the PHONES notes, hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against defendant Bell-Phillip Television Productions, Inc., who has neither moved nor answered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/26/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(rjm)
July 25, 2012 Filing 502 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Toshiro Hiraide on behalf of The Betty H. Roeland Marital Trust, The Roeland Family Trust UA 8/19/86 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Hiraide, Mark)
July 19, 2012 Filing 501 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of The Joy Leichenger Trust Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Schneider, Marc)
July 18, 2012 Filing 500 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by San Francisco City & County Employees' Retirement System.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Miller, Richard)
July 18, 2012 Filing 499 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard S. Miller on behalf of San Francisco City & County Employees' Retirement System Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Miller, Richard)
July 13, 2012 Filing 498 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. P. Chamberlain served on 4/25/2012, answer due 5/16/2012; Daniel D. Pecaro served on 5/29/2012, answer due 6/19/2012; Shelley Weege served on 5/24/2012, answer due 6/14/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 497 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial case management conference having been conducted on July 10, 2012, the following schedule is entered on consent:1. Defendants in the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company, et al v. FitzSimons, et al., 12 Civ 2652 (WHP) (the "Committee Action") are directed to submit a proposed organizational structure comprised of an executive committee of counsel who will fairly represent each group of defendants in this multi district litigation whose interests are similarly aligned. See Manual for Complex Litig., 10.221 (4th ed. 2004). The proposed organizational structure will be subject to this Court's approval and should be docketed on 12 MD 2296 by August 3, 2012. This Court appoints Grippo & Elden LLC to act as interim liaison counsel for defendants in the Committee Action.2.If defendants in the Committee Action cannot agree on a proposed organizational structure, competing applications for executive committees should be docketed on 12 MC 2296 and all related actions and submitted to chambers no later than August 3, 2012.3. Interim liaison counsel are directed to submit a proposed Master Case Order No. 3 consistent with this Court's directives by August 7, 2012. Where the parties cannot agree, they should submit alternative proposals for the Court's consideration. If necessary, the parties are permitted to submit letter memoranda in support of their respective positions. 4.Plaintiffs are directed to submit a letter memorandum outlining the limited discovery they now wish to pursue by July 26, 2012. Defendants shall submit a letter memorandum in response by August 16, 2012 5.This multi district litigation and all consolidated actions remain stayed in all other respects. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/11/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(js)
July 11, 2012 Filing 496 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David N. Dunn on behalf of McConnell Foundation Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Dunn, David)
July 5, 2012 Filing 495 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Poindexter & Doutre, New Attorney: Laura K. Kim, Address: Musick, Peeler & Garrett LLP, One Wilshire Blvd., Suite 2000, Los Angeles, CA, USA 90017, 213-629-7633. Document filed by The Margaret McKensie Living Trust U/A DTD 2/23/94. (Kim, Laura)
June 29, 2012 Filing 494 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
June 28, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #487 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 06/22/2012, Receipt Number 1041751. (jd)
June 27, 2012 Filing 492 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The William D. MacDonald & Nancy L. MacDonald Trust U/A 7/21 waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
June 27, 2012 Filing 491 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. served on 5/25/2012, answer due 6/15/2012; John A. Orb served on 5/9/2012, answer due 5/30/2012; The Weege Family Trust U/A 6/21/89 served on 5/24/2012, answer due 6/14/2012; Reinhold Weege served on 5/24/2012, answer due 6/14/2012; The Trust for the Benefit of Sherry P. Broder U/A DTD 1/1/94 served on 5/9/2012, answer due 5/30/2012; The Pecaro Family Trust DTD 4/12/02 served on 5/29/2012, answer due 6/19/2012; Ofelia R. Pecaro served on 5/29/2012, answer due 6/19/2012; The Joy Leichenger Trust served on 6/4/2012, answer due 6/25/2012; William Osborn served on 5/31/2012, answer due 6/21/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 493 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL:PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the law firm of Entwistle & Cappucci LLP hereby enters its appearance as proposed counsel for defendant Denise Meck, and G. Douglas Kilday and the law firm of Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody hereby withdraw as counsel of record for Denise Meck and shall have no further responsibility in this matter. Denise Meck hereby requests that all pleadings, notices, orders, and other papers given or filed in the above-captioned matter be given and served upon the following person at the address, telephone number, and e- mail address indicated in this order., Attorney G Douglas Kilday terminated. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lmb)
June 25, 2012 Filing 490 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties of even date herewith, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the PHONES notes, hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against defendant Randy Steiner, who has neither moved nor answered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(lmb)
June 25, 2012 Filing 489 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL:Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the PHONES notes, hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against defendants J. De Werd, as Trustee of the De Werd Trust dated 05/04/1998; M. De Werd as Trustee of the De Werd Trust Dated 05/04/1998 and The De Werd Trust Dated 05/04/1998, who have neither moved nor answered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(lmb)
June 25, 2012 Filing 488 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the PHONES notes, hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against defendant Alexander B. Potts, who has neither moved nor answered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(lmb)
June 22, 2012 Filing 487 MOTION for William M. Iadarola to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Jupiter Capital Partners LLC.(pgu)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Menaker & Herrmann LLP is substituted in place of Stephen Alan Schneider as counsel of record for Defendants Ronald C. Cey, Frances L. Cey, and FBO Cey Living Trust in the above captioned action. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/19/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(djc)
June 19, 2012 Filing 485 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jupiter Capital Partners LLC served on 5/22/2012, answer due 6/12/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
June 19, 2012 Filing 484 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The 10/03/2007 Dalton Trust served on 5/9/2012, answer due 5/30/2012; Eureka Options LLC served on 5/19/2012, answer due 6/11/2012; Cutler Group LP served on 5/18/2012, answer due 6/8/2012; ETRADE Securities LLC served on 5/14/2012, answer due 6/4/2012; Laurie Mitchell served on 4/29/2012, answer due 5/21/2012; McConnell Foundation served on 4/24/2012, answer due 5/15/2012; The Hammond Family Trust U/A/D 2/11/88 served on 5/20/2012, answer due 6/11/2012. Service was accepted by Laurie Mitchell on behalf of The Woods/Mitchell Family Trust and Brent V. Woods. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
June 12, 2012 Filing 482 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Stephen Alan Schneider, New Attorney: Menaker & Herrmann LLP. Document filed by Frances L. Cey(individually and as a Trustee of FBO Cey Living Trust 5/14/87), Ronald C. Cey(individually and as a Trustee of FBO Cey Living Trust 5/14/87).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Menaker, Richard)
June 8, 2012 Filing 479 MOTION for William K. Dodds to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios, Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income.(Dodds, William)
June 7, 2012 Filing 478 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Steven John Purcell on behalf of Frances L. Cey(individually and as a Trustee of FBO Cey Living Trust 5/14/87), Ronald C. Cey(individually and as a Trustee of FBO Cey Living Trust 5/14/87). New Address: Menaker & Herrmann LLP, 10 East 40th Street, New York, NY, 10016, 212-545-1900. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Purcell, Steven)
June 5, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 7/10/2012 at 11:30 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III. Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lmb)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 477 MASTER CASE ORDER No. 2: The Clerk of the Court (the "Clerk") is directed to transfer docket entry ECF No. 692 (Order Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer Order) from 11 MD 2296 to the master case file bearing docket number 12 MC 2296 and number it ECF No. 18 on 12 MC 2296. The Clerk is directed to docket this Master Case Order No. 2 as ECF No. 19 on 12 MC 2296, and docket it on 11 MD 2296 and on all of the consolidated actions. Interim Lead Plaintiffs: The Clerk is directed to add the following plaintiff to the master case file: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company on behalf of Tribune Company, et al. (the "Unsecured Creditors Committee"). Accordingly, the docket sheet of 12 MC 2296 should list only the following plaintiffs: (i) Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (ii) Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (iii) Wilmington Trust Company, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the Phones Notes, (iv) William A. Niese, on behalf of a Putative Class of Tribune Company Retirees, and (v) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company on behalf of Tribune Company, et al. Interim Liaison Counsel for the Unsecured Creditors Committee: This Court appoints Zuckerman Spaeder LLP ("Zuckerman Spaeder") as interim liaison counsel for the Unsecured Creditors Committee and as further set forth in this order. All pending motions for substitution of counsel are granted. Notwithstanding the stay, parties may make motions to substitute counsel, and all such motions shall be docketed only on 11 MD 2296 and the relevant related actions and shall include a proposed order. Any party submitting a motion for substitution of counsel is directed to send a courtesy copy of the proposed order to chambers. No defendant has opposed Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' motion is granted. The time under Fed R. Civ. P. 4(m) for Plaintiffs to serve all summonses and complaints (as they have been or may be amended from time to time, subject to and in accordance with Fed R. Civ. P. 15 and 21) in all actions, and the time period referenced in Fed R. Civ. P. 15(c)(1)(C), is enlarged through and including August 31, 2012, retroactive to March 29, 2012. With respect to defendants who may be added as defendants or changed through amendments in any action on or after March 29, 2012, including defendants within the putative defendant classes who Plaintiffs determine should be individually named, the time under Fed R. Civ. P. 4(m) for Plaintiffs to serve the summonses and complaints (as they have been or may be amended from time to time, subject to and in accordance with Fed R. Civ. P. 15 and 21), and the time period referenced in Fed R. Civ. P. 15(c)(1)(C), shall expire no earlier than August 31, 2012. This Court will hold an initial pretrial conference with all interim liaison counsel on July 10, 2012 at 11:30 a.m. to discuss, inter alia, Defendants' co-interim liaison counsel's proposed organizational structure, a preliminary case management schedule, including a schedule for any motions to dismiss, the continuance of the stay, and any other issues counsel wish to raise. Notwithstanding Bankruptcy Judge Kevin J. Carey's Order Partially Lifting Stay of Adversary Proceedings and State Law Fraudulent Conveyance Actions, dated March 15, 2012, this multidistrict litigation and all consolidated actions remain stayed in all other respects. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lmb)
June 1, 2012 Filing 476 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Albena Ilkova Petrakov on behalf of Frances L. Cey(individually and as a Trustee of FBO Cey Living Trust 5/14/87), Ronald C. Cey(individually and as a Trustee of FBO Cey Living Trust 5/14/87) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Petrakov, Albena)
June 1, 2012 Filing 475 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven John Purcell on behalf of Frances L. Cey(individually and as a Trustee of FBO Cey Living Trust 5/14/87), Ronald C. Cey(individually and as a Trustee of FBO Cey Living Trust 5/14/87) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Purcell, Steven)
June 1, 2012 Filing 474 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Glen Menaker on behalf of Frances L. Cey(individually and as a Trustee of FBO Cey Living Trust 5/14/87), Ronald C. Cey(individually and as a Trustee of FBO Cey Living Trust 5/14/87) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Menaker, Richard)
May 31, 2012 Filing 472 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Lawrence Cook on behalf of Derek M. Dalton, Karen E. Dalton, The 10/03/2007 Dalton Trust Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Cook, David)
May 30, 2012 Filing 483 PRO SE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Dorothy Flibbert by The 12/09/90 Tommie L. Cordero Trust. (lmb)
May 30, 2012 Filing 481 ANSWER of Dorothy Flibbert, served as John Doe as trustee of the Tommie L. Cordero Trust, to #386 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Dorothy Flibbert.(mro)
May 30, 2012 Payment of Fee Received: Check #6164 was received from Dorothy Flibbert on 05/30/2012 in the amount of $350.00. However the check was returned back to the litigant because it was in the form of a Personal Check. The check was returned via Fedex Airbill # 877126696752 on 05/30/2012. (jcs)
May 23, 2012 Filing 471 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jose Guillermo Sepulveda on behalf of TradeStation Securities, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Sepulveda, Jose)
May 21, 2012 Filing 470 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jane Dall Wilson on behalf of Gamma Phi Beta Foundation, Gamma Phi Beta Foundation, Inc. (Wilson, Jane)
May 18, 2012 Filing 469 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Enhanced RAFI (R) US Large, L.P.(sued herein as Research Affiliates Fundamental Index LP) waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; John F. Llewellyn waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; The Francesca J. Verdusco Trust U/A DTD 12/13/1989 waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; The Benjamin J. Verdusco Trust U/A DTD 12/13/89 waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; The Christopher J. Appleby Trust U/A DTD 12/13/89 waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; The Felicity J. Appleby Trust U/A DTD 12/13/89 waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; The James F. Polk Trust U/A DTD 12/13/89 waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; The John F. Llewellyn Living Trust waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; The John Stewart Property Trust waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; The Tillman Family Trust U/A DTD 7/29/80 waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Eugene Tillman waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Ina Tillman waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Jonathan A. Tillman waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Betty Beaird waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
May 18, 2012 Filing 468 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Neubauer on behalf of Mary E. Day Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Neubauer, Mark)
May 18, 2012 Filing 467 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Neubauer on behalf of Peter J Fernald, Peter J. Fernald, Marlowe G. Merkel Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Neubauer, Mark)
May 18, 2012 Filing 466 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The 12/09/90 Tommie L. Cordero Trust served on 5/3/2012, answer due 5/24/2012; Bank of the West served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/18/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
May 18, 2012 Filing 465 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Kyung Kim on behalf of Lolita K. Wagner (Kim, Laura)
May 18, 2012 Filing 464 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (Kim, Laura)
May 17, 2012 Filing 463 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Enhanced RAFI (R) US Large, L.P.(sued herein as Research Affiliates Fundamental Index LP).(Ericson, Bruce)
May 17, 2012 Filing 462 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce A. Ericson on behalf of Enhanced RAFI (R) US Large, L.P.(sued herein as Research Affiliates Fundamental Index LP) (Ericson, Bruce)
May 16, 2012 Filing 461 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Producer - Writers Guild of America Pension Trust.(Ratner, Stephen)
May 16, 2012 Filing 460 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carl Clyde Forbes on behalf of Producer - Writers Guild of America Pension Trust (Forbes, Carl)
May 16, 2012 Filing 459 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Steve Mordkoff on behalf of Producer - Writers Guild of America Pension Trust (Mordkoff, David)
May 16, 2012 Filing 458 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harry Frischer on behalf of Producer - Writers Guild of America Pension Trust (Frischer, Harry)
May 16, 2012 Filing 457 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Leonard Ratner on behalf of Producer - Writers Guild of America Pension Trust (Ratner, Stephen)
May 11, 2012 Filing 456 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The Margaret McKensie Living Trust U/A DTD 2/23/94 waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
May 11, 2012 Filing 455 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Gordon Chamberlain served on 4/25/2012, answer due 5/16/2012; Sally H. Contant served on 5/1/2012, answer due 5/22/2012; Elizabeth G. Chamberlain Trust U/A DTD 4/25/1979 served on 4/25/2012, answer due 5/16/2012; Olivia Jean Williams Designated Benefit Plan/TOD served on 4/28/2012, answer due 5/21/2012; Sybil Jinx Robinson served on 5/1/2012, answer due 5/22/2012; The Herman R. Friedberg Revocable Trust served on 5/2/2012, answer due 5/23/2012; The Hill Revocable Living Trust DTD 12/24/91 served on 5/2/2012, answer due 5/23/2012; The Sally H. Contant Trust U/A DTD 10/13/83 served on 5/1/2012, answer due 5/22/2012; The Sybil Jinx Robinson Separate Property Trust served on 5/1/2012, answer due 5/22/2012; The Woods/Mitchell Family Trust served on 4/29/2012, answer due 5/21/2012; Olivia Jean Williams served on 4/28/2012, answer due 5/21/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
May 11, 2012 Filing 454 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
May 8, 2012 Filing 453 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ira M. Levee on behalf of Southwest Carpenters Pension Trust (Levee, Ira)
May 4, 2012 Filing 452 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John T. Cu on behalf of State of California, Department of Personnel Administration, Savings Plus Plan Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Cu, John)
May 4, 2012 Filing 451 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jahan P. Raissi on behalf of Weintraub Capital Management, L.P. (Raissi, Jahan)
May 4, 2012 Filing 450 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. State of California, Department of Personnel Administration, Savings Plus Plan waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
May 4, 2012 Filing 449 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Brandes Investment Partners L.P. served on 4/30/2012, answer due 6/29/2012; The Betty Beaird Living Trust US 10-APR-87 served on 4/28/2012, answer due 6/27/2012; The Trust by Antoinette B. Brumbaugh U/A Dated 10/05/94 served on 4/28/2012, answer due 6/27/2012; Oakmont Management served on 4/28/2012, answer due 6/27/2012; Daryl V. Dichek served on 4/25/2012, answer due 6/25/2012; Shirley Dichek served on 4/26/2012, answer due 6/25/2012; The Dichek Family Trust Dated 12/11/74 served on 4/26/2012, answer due 6/25/2012; The Don & Irene Baron Family Trust 7B-251 served on 4/28/2012, answer due 6/27/2012; Declaration of Bell Family Trust Meadowbrooks Equity Fund UA 12/1/86 served on 4/30/2012, answer due 6/29/2012; Glen W. Bell served on 4/30/2012, answer due 6/29/2012; Kathleen B. Flynn served on 4/30/2012, answer due 6/29/2012; Martha A. Bell served on 4/30/2012, answer due 6/29/2012; Declaration of Bell Family Trust UA 12/1/86 served on 4/30/2012, answer due 6/29/2012; The Richard Haigler & Despina Haigler Living Trust U/A 11/4/91 served on 4/29/2012, answer due 6/28/2012; #502 U/W/O Minnette R. Eckhouse Trust served on 4/28/2012, answer due 6/27/2012; The John & Betty Altman Family Trust UAD 05/16/86 served on 4/29/2012, answer due 6/28/2012; Vyvian Heath served on 4/26/2012, answer due 6/25/2012; The Lolita Wagner Living Trust U/A/D 10/07/88 served on 4/30/2012, answer due 6/29/2012; The Betty H. Roeland Marital Trust served on 4/29/2012, answer due 6/28/2012; The Roeland Family Trust UA 8/19/86 served on 4/29/2012, answer due 6/28/2012; The Alfred W. Merkel Marlowe G. Merkel Trust served on 4/28/2012, answer due 6/27/2012; Thomas B. O'Keefe served on 4/26/2012, answer due 6/25/2012; The Rosenberg Revocable Trust served on 4/30/2012, answer due 6/29/2012; Alexander B. Potts served on 4/30/2012, answer due 6/29/2012; Samuel S. Moore served on 4/27/2012, answer due 6/26/2012; Samuel S. Moore Trust U/A DTD 10/11/1988 served on 4/27/2012, answer due 6/26/2012; Donavon Virgil Schuler served on 4/26/2012, answer due 6/25/2012; Sylvia Gates Schuler served on 4/26/2012, answer due 6/25/2012; The Schuler Trust served on 4/26/2012, answer due 6/25/2012; The Trust for the Benefit of Susan H. Shane served on 4/30/2012, answer due 6/29/2012; Brent V. Woods served on 4/29/2012, answer due 6/28/2012; Dennis Eugene De Haas served on 4/29/2012, answer due 6/28/2012; Intel Corporation served on 4/25/2012, answer due 6/25/2012; MC Investment Partners LLC served on 4/29/2012, answer due 6/28/2012; California Physicians' Service D/B/A Blue Shield California served on 4/27/2012, answer due 6/26/2012; San Francisco & County Employees' Retirement System served on 4/26/2012, answer due 6/25/2012; Santa Clara University served on 4/25/2012, answer due 6/25/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
April 30, 2012 Filing 448 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Peter J. Fernald served on 4/25/2012, answer due 5/16/2012; THE PETER J. FERNALD TRUST U/A 1/13/92; served on 4/25/2012, answer due 5/16/2012; Mary E. Day served on 4/23/2012, answer due 5/14/2012; GCW Capital LLC served on 4/25/2012, answer due 5/16/2012; Stephanie Murray served on 4/23/2012, answer due 5/14/2012; The Stephanie Murray Living Trust served on 4/23/2012, answer due 5/14/2012; Patricia H. Yeomans served on 4/25/2012, answer due 5/16/2012; The Yeomans Family Trust U/A 2/22/92 served on 4/25/2012, answer due 5/16/2012; Automobile Club of Southern California served on 4/20/2012, answer due 5/11/2012; Southwest Carpenters Pension Trust served on 4/19/2012, answer due 5/10/2012; City Employees' Retirement System of the City of Los Angeles served on 4/19/2012, answer due 5/10/2012; City of Los Angeles Fire and Police Pension Plan served on 4/19/2012, answer due 5/10/2012; Harvey Mudd College served on 4/24/2012, answer due 5/15/2012; Gamma Phi Beta Foundation served on 4/23/2012, answer due 5/14/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
April 30, 2012 Filing 447 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Carol Askin waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Richard Askin waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Floyd C. Sanger, Jr waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Bernard Shapiro waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Rena Shapiro waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; The Bernard and Rena Shapiro Intervivos Trust A/C #1 Dated 10/15/87 waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; The Kaszton Family Trust UAD 10/23/97 waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; The U/A DTA 03/29/04 Joanne Desherow waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; U/A/D 07/14/2000 FBO The 2000 Peckham Family Trust waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Askin Family Trust waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; The Trust U/A DTD 11/07/94 for the Benefit of S. Keating and Carol Rhoads waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
April 26, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney BENJAMIN GORDON to RE-FILE Document #410 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parent or Other Affiliate was not added for the party(ies). Re-file the document and add the Corporate Parent or Other Affiliate. Failure to properly add corporate parents or other affiliates in ECF will inhibit the system review for possible conflicts. (kco)
April 25, 2012 Filing 446 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent WellPoint, Inc. for Blue Cross of California. Document filed by Blue Cross of California.(Pollack, Gayle)
April 25, 2012 Filing 445 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gayle Elise Pollack on behalf of Blue Cross of California (Pollack, Gayle)
April 25, 2012 Filing 444 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard S. Wolfson on behalf of Blue Cross of California (Wolfson, Howard)
April 24, 2012 Filing 443 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Master Trust Bank of Japan LTD. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Stone, Alan)
April 24, 2012 Filing 442 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company, as trustee of Christiana Care Health Services Retirement Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 24, 2012 Filing 441 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee of Self-Insurance Reserve Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 24, 2012 Filing 440 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee of Self-Insurance Reserve Fund, Wilmington Trust Company, as trustee of Christiana Care Health Services Retirement Plan Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 23, 2012 Filing 439 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Iris B. Mahoney. (Mahoney, Paul)
April 23, 2012 Filing 438 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. William Stinehart Jr.(an individual) waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Warren B. Williamson waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
April 23, 2012 Filing 437 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; The John Lanfranki & Virginia Lanfranki Trust 4/29/80 waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Wedbush Securities Inc. waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Chandler Trust No. 1 waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Chandler Trust No. 2 waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Blue Cross of California waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Stinehart Living Trust waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Patrick K. Stinehart waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Gamma Phi Beta Foundation, Inc. waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
April 20, 2012 Filing 436 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Directors Guild of America Producer Pension Trust waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; FBO Dunaway Family Trust U/A/D 07-05-1991 waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Santa Barbara County Employees Retirement System waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; The E. Donald Heymann Trust waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Aviv Nevo waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Maria Finch Cannell waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Felix Tong waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Producer - Writers Guild of America Pension Trust waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
April 19, 2012 Filing 435 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Christiana Care Health Services Investment Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 19, 2012 Filing 434 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Christiana Care Unrestricted Investment Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 19, 2012 Filing 433 MOTION for Lawrence A. Baskin to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by E. Donald Heymann. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Mayer, Jeffrey)
April 18, 2012 Filing 432 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard John Kohlbrand on behalf of Carol Askin, Richard Askin (Kohlbrand, Richard)
April 18, 2012 Filing 431 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Asa Robison Danes on behalf of Polly H. Howells, Eric D. Werthman, Jesse Werthman, Nicholas H. Werthman, Nicholas H. Werthman Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Danes, Asa)
April 18, 2012 Filing 430 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Polly H. Howells, Eric D. Werthman, Nicholas H. Werthman Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Buchanan, David)
April 18, 2012 Filing 429 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Robert Edward Bellack waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Jr University waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Robert J. Brookes waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Patricia Kaszton waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; William Kaszton waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Kiener LP waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Chase L. Leavitt waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Nancy L. Mac Donald waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Renee H. Miller waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; George J. Peckham waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Imogene S. Peckham waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Javad Rassouli waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Carol Rhoads waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; S Keating Rhoads waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Joanne Desherow Sanger waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; The 3/10/87 Trust for the Benefit of R.J. Brookes & V.M. Brookes waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Phillip B. Chase Revocable Trust dated 7/28/94 waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; The Helen Grossman Trust dated 9/8/99 waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; The Alfred V. Tjarks Retirement Plan dtd 2/18/85 waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Yield Strategies Fund I, LP waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
April 18, 2012 Filing 428 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Douglas B. Stewart served on 3/25/2012, answer due 4/16/2012; Carl Zlatchin served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
April 18, 2012 Filing 427 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Peter R. Marino waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
April 17, 2012 Filing 426 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of U/A/D 07/14/2000 FBO The 2000 Peckham Family Trust Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Schneider, Marc)
April 17, 2012 Filing 425 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of Floyd C. Sanger, Jr, as Trustee of the Floyd C. Sanger Jr. Trust U/A 3/11/86 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Schneider, Marc)
April 17, 2012 Filing 424 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of Sanger Living Trust Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Schneider, Marc)
April 17, 2012 Filing 423 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly Anne Hancock on behalf of Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund (Hancock, Kimberly)
April 17, 2012 Filing 422 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of The Kaszton Family Trust UAD 10/23/97 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Schneider, Marc)
April 17, 2012 Filing 421 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly Anne Hancock on behalf of Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund (Hancock, Kimberly)
April 17, 2012 Filing 420 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Doluisio on behalf of Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Monumental Life Insurance Company, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios (Doluisio, Michael)
April 17, 2012 Filing 419 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Michael Zieff on behalf of Douglas B. Stewart Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Zieff, Paul)
April 17, 2012 Filing 418 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Michael Zieff on behalf of John W. Stewart II Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Zieff, Paul)
April 17, 2012 Filing 417 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Christiana Care Health Services Investment Fund, Christiana Care Unrestricted Investment Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 16, 2012 Filing 416 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Neal Robert Troum on behalf of Genworth Financial Wealth Management, Guidemark Large Cap Value Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Troum, Neal)
April 13, 2012 Filing 415 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Cameron Kessenick on behalf of Clearwater Growth Fund, John Hancock Financial Services Inc., VFTC-Vanguard Company Stock Markey Account 21, MML Equity Income Fund, T. Rowe Price Retirement Plan Services, Inc., Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Frank Russell Investments, Frank Russell Trust, Frank Russell, Russell Equity I Fund, Russell Investment Company, Russell Investment Company Diversified Equity Fund, Russell Investment Group, Russell Investments, Russell US Core Equity Fund, HARBOR CAPITAL GROUP TRUST, HARBOR MID CAP VALUE FUND, Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc., Linda Molenda, OptionsXpress, Inc., SBL FUND SERIES H, MML Blend Fund, MML Equity Income Fund, Manulife Asset Management (US) LLC, Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd, Charles Swab & Co., Inc., Aegon/Transamerica Series Fund - TRP, Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Vanguard Asset Allocation Fund, Inc., Vanguard Balanced Index Fund, Inc., Vanguard Equity Income Fund, Inc., Vanguard Fenway Funds, Vanguard Fiduciary Trust Company, Vanguard Group Inc., Vanguard Group Ltd., Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Institutional Index Fund, Vanguard Malvern Funds, Vanguard Quantitative Funds, Vanguard Valley Forge Funds, Vanguard Whitehall Funds, Vanguard World Fund, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd./Non-Flip Account C/O Amida Capital Management, LLC, Caxton Associates LP, Clearwater Investment, Walker House SPV Ltd., Caxton Associates LLC, Oppenheimer Main Street Select Fund, Oppenheimer Main Street Small & Mid-Cap Fund, Oppenheimer Variable Account Funds, OppenheimerFunds, Inc., Pro Shares UItra S&P 500, Rydex Investments, Rydex Series Funds Multi-Hedge Strategies Fund, Rydex Series Funds S&P 500 Pure Value Fund, Rydex Variable S&P 500 Pure Value Fund, Rydex Variable Trust Multi-Hedge Strategies Fund, Security Global Investors-Rydex/SGI, Charles Schwab Inv Mgt Co, Monumental Life Insurance Co, The Vanguard Group Inc, Vanguard Financial Group Inc, Vanguard Group Inc, Caxton International Limited, Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Kessenick, Scott)
April 13, 2012 Filing 414 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Bilus on behalf of Clearwater Growth Fund, John Hancock Financial Services Inc., VFTC-Vanguard Company Stock Markey Account 21, MML Equity Income Fund, T. Rowe Price Retirement Plan Services, Inc., Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Frank Russell Investments, Frank Russell Trust, Frank Russell, Russell Equity I Fund, Russell Investment Company, Russell Investment Company Diversified Equity Fund, Russell Investment Group, Russell Investments, Russell US Core Equity Fund, HARBOR CAPITAL GROUP TRUST, HARBOR MID CAP VALUE FUND, Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc., Kathleen Maloney, OptionsXpress, Inc., SBL FUND SERIES H, MML Blend Fund, MML Equity Income Fund, Manulife Asset Management (US) LLC, Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd, Charles Swab & Co., Inc., Aegon/Transamerica Series Fund - TRP, Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Vanguard Asset Allocation Fund, Inc., Vanguard Balanced Index Fund, Inc., Vanguard Equity Income Fund, Inc., Vanguard Fenway Funds, Vanguard Fiduciary Trust Company, Vanguard Group Inc., Vanguard Group Ltd., Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Institutional Index Fund, Vanguard Malvern Funds, Vanguard Quantitative Funds, Vanguard Valley Forge Funds, Vanguard Whitehall Funds, Vanguard World Fund, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd./Non-Flip Account C/O Amida Capital Management, LLC, Caxton Associates LP, Clearwater Investment, Walker House SPV Ltd., Caxton Associates LLC, Oppenheimer Main Street Select Fund, Oppenheimer Main Street Small & Mid-Cap Fund, Oppenheimer Variable Account Funds, OppenheimerFunds, Inc., Pro Shares UItra S&P 500, Rydex Investments, Rydex Series Funds Multi-Hedge Strategies Fund, Rydex Series Funds S&P 500 Pure Value Fund, Rydex Variable S&P 500 Pure Value Fund, Rydex Variable Trust Multi-Hedge Strategies Fund, Charles Schwab Inv Mgt Co, Monumental Life Insurance Co, Vanguard Financial Group Inc, Vanguard Group Inc, Caxton International Limited, Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Monumental Life Insurance Company, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bilus, Alexander)
April 12, 2012 Filing 413 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. John M. Altman waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; John E. Flick waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Lois L. Flick waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Genworth Financial Wealth Management waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Guidemark Large Cap Value Fund waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Susan H. Shane waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; James G. Up De Graff waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Marilyn M. Matheson waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012; Richard T. Yu waiver sent on 3/9/2012, answer due 5/8/2012. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
April 12, 2012 Filing 412 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Louis Metzger on behalf of FBO Dunaway Family Trust U/A/D 07-05-1991, Michael W. Dunaway, Trudy V. Dunaway Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Metzger, Scott)
April 12, 2012 Filing 411 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Doniak, Christine)
April 11, 2012 Filing 410 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Genworth Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent Centurion Capital Group, Inc. for Genworth Financial Wealth Management. Document filed by Genworth Financial Wealth Management.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Gordon, Benjamin) Modified on 4/26/2012 (kco).
April 11, 2012 Filing 409 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Evan Gordon on behalf of Genworth Financial Wealth Management, Guidemark Large Cap Value Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Gordon, Benjamin)
April 4, 2012 Filing 408 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher A. Lynch on behalf of Santa Barbara County Employees Retirement System (Lynch, Christopher)
April 4, 2012 Filing 407 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary C. Dunn on behalf of Dorothy Russell Shattuck Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Dunn, Mary)
April 4, 2012 Filing 406 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Mark Elliott, New Attorney: Michael C. D'Agostino. Document filed by T. Rowe Price, T.Rowe Price.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael)
April 4, 2012 Filing 405 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Jonathan A. Loeb, New Attorney: Michael C. D'Agostino. Document filed by Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV, Water and Power Employee's Ret. Disab. & Death Benefit Ins. Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael)
April 3, 2012 Filing 404 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Amended Complaint served on City National Bank on 1/31/12. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Solano, Ricardo)
April 2, 2012 Filing 403 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of Carol Rhoads(individually and as a Trustee of U/A DTD 11/07/1994 by S Keating and Carol Rhoads), S Keating Rhoads Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Schneider, Marc)
March 30, 2012 Filing 402 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua W Mahoney on behalf of Robert Edward Bellack (Mahoney, Joshua)
March 30, 2012 Filing 401 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maile Hitomi Solis on behalf of Robert Edward Bellack (Solis, Maile)
March 30, 2012 Filing 400 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John R. McCambridge on behalf of Robert Edward Bellack (McCambridge, John)
March 30, 2012 Filing 399 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George R Dougherty on behalf of Robert Edward Bellack (Dougherty, George)
March 29, 2012 Filing 398 DECLARATION of Jay Teitelbaum in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 397 DECLARATION of Andrew N. Goldfarb in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 396 DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 395 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 394 MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 393 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: John R. Shiner, Adam P. Brezine and Patrick J. Hagan of Bryan Cave LLP, New Attorney: Mark A. Neubauer of Steptoe & Johnson LLP, Address: Steptoe & Johnson LLP, 2121 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 2800, Los Angeles, California, USA 90067-5052, 310-734-3210. Document filed by Chase L. Leavitt. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Neubauer, Mark)
March 29, 2012 Filing 392 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Leslie R. Horowitz of Clark & Trevithick, New Attorney: Mark A. Neubauer of Steptoe & Johnson LLP, Address: Steptoe & Johnson LLP, 2121 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 2800, Los Angeles, California, USA 90067-5052, 310-734-3210. Document filed by Javad Rassouli. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Neubauer, Mark)
March 29, 2012 Filing 391 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Charles Bohan on behalf of Vincent A Badali, The Spurgeon Family Limited Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David) Modified on 4/4/2012 (ldi).
March 26, 2012 Filing 390 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of Robert J. Brookes, The 3/10/87 Trust for the Benefit of R.J. Brookes & V.M. Brookes Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Schneider, Marc)
March 26, 2012 Filing 389 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of Kiener LP Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Schneider, Marc)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 388 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WITH STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND ORDER: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the following attorney, who is admitted to practice before this Court, respectfully enters his appearance as proposed counsel- of-record for defendant NANCY D. RAMAGE in the above-captioned proceeding, and requests that all pleadings, notices, orders and other papers be served upon him at the address set forth in this order. PLEASE TAKE FURTHER NOTICE that CHRISTENSEN GLASER et al. LLP, n/k/a GLASER, WEIL, FINK, JACOBS, HOWARD, AVCHEN & SHAPIRO, LLP (Craig Howard Marcus and Miriam Judith Golbert) hereby withdraws as counsel-of-record for defendant NANCY D. RAMAGE in the above-captioned proceeding and consents to the substitution of RANDALL T. SIMS, ESQ. as counsel-of-record., Attorney Randall Thomas Sims for Nancy D. Ramage added. Attorney Miriam Judith Golbert and Craig Howard Marcus terminated. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/20/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(lmb)
March 7, 2012 Filing 385 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Court Order dated February 14, 2012 on 2/15/12. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
March 6, 2012 Filing 386 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against All Defendants.Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wilmington Trust Company. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas.(pl)
March 6, 2012 Filing 384 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
February 28, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK in the amount of $200.00, paid on 02/21/2012, Receipt Number 1030310. PAYMENT PRO HAC VICE FOR SCOTT L. METZGER (jd)
February 28, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK in the amount of $200.00, paid on 02/15/2012, Receipt Number 1029948. PAYMENT PRO HAC VICE FOR MICHAEL L. KLEINS (jd)
February 27, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK in the amount of $200.00, paid on 02/06/2012, Receipt Number 1028906. PAYMENT PRO HAC VICE FOR STUART LIBICKI (jd)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 383 MASTER CASE ORDER No. 1: In the exercise of its informed discretion, this Court restructures this multidistrict litigation as follows: The Clerk is directed to open a master case file bearing docket number 12 MC 2296. Any filing fees associated with opening the master case file docket are waived. The Clerk is directed to transfer the following docket entries from 11 MD 2296 to 12 MC 2296: ECF Nos. 1 (Transfer Order), 17 (Master Stay Order), 39 (Pilot Project Removal Order), 41 (Protective Order No.1), 62 (Pro Hac Order), 386 (Status Letter Order), 499 (Notice of Case Reassignment), and 559 (Temporary Stay Order). Those docket entries are to be numbered ECF Nos. 1-8, respectively, on 12 MC 2296. This Order shall be docketed as ECF No. 9 in 12 MC 2296 and docketed on all matters consolidated in 11 MD 2296. This Order and all subsequent docket entries on 12 MC 2296 are to be docketed simultaneously on 11 MD 2296. In addition, each subsequent filing by the parties on 12 MC 2296 or 11 MD 2296 shall indicate whether the filing should be docketed in all related actions or only in specified related actions. Counsel are reminded that filings are to be spread across all related actions only when necessary. Papers filed inappropriately will be stricken from the docket. Interim Lead Plaintiffs: The Clerk is further directed to list on the docket sheet of 12 MC 2296 only the following plaintiffs: (i) Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (ii) Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (iii) Wilmington Trust Company, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the Phones Notes, and (iv) William A. Niese, on behalf of a Putative Class of Tribune Company Retirees. Plaintiffs (i)-(iii) collectively are hereafter referred to as the "Note Holders" and plaintiff (iv) is referred to as the "Retirees." Interim Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs: This Court appoints Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP ("Akin Gump") as interim liaison counsel for the Note Holders and Teitelbaum & Baskin, LLP (the "Teitelbaum Firm") as interim liaison counsel for the Retirees. All counsel for plaintiffs are directed to confer for the purpose of identifying who among them intend to submit motion papers or memoranda to this Court, appear in person for conferences, or offer oral arguments to the Court. Plaintiffs are directed to submit a list to the Court identifying such counsel by March 30, 2012. Interim Lead Defendants: Based on a preliminary review of the complaints in the related actions, this Court endeavored to select interim lead defendants with a sufficient financial interest and who represent different classes of shareholders. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to list on the docket sheet of 12 MC 2296 only the following defendants: The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, on behalf of A Putative Class of Former Tribune Company Shareholders, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated, on behalf of A Putative Class of Former Tribune Company Shareholders, and Mario J. Gabelli, on behalf of A Putative Class of Former Tribune Company Shareholders. This Court appoints Proskauer Rose LLP (for The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation), Kaye Scholer, LLP (for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated), and Entwistle & Cappucci LLP (for Mario J. Gabelli) to act as interim co-liaison counsel for defendants. These firms are collectively referred to as "defendants' interim co-liaison counsel." Defendants are directed to submit a proposed organizational structure comprised of an executive committee of counsel who will fairly represent each group of defendants in this multidistrict litigation whose interests are similarly aligned. The proposed organizational structure will be subject to this Court's approval and should be docketed on 12 MD 2296 by April 20, 2012; as further set forth in this Master Case Order No. 1. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/23/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(mro)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER: The stay entered in this multi district litigation on December 28, 2012 by Judge Richard J. Holwell (ECF No. 17), and modified by Order dated January 27, 2012 (ECF No. 386), is further modified as follows: No party to this action is permitted to make any motion, file any documents on the docket, or submit any papers to the Clerk's Office or this Court's chambers until further notice from this Court. It is further ordered that all pending motions for admission pro hac vice are denied without prejudice. The Clerk ofthe Court is directed to terminate all pending motions for admission pro hac vice. This Court will establish a procedure for attorneys to appear in this action by subsequent order. Plaintiffs are directed to serve this Order on all Defendants forthwith. This order relates to all pro hac vice motions filed by attorneys in 11-MD-2296 and all related cases, denying (243) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (244) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (245) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (253) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (151) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04522-WHP; denying (320) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04538-WHP; denying (501) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04784-WHP; denying (81) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (159) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (184) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (185) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (189) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (190) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (191) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (194) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (196) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (203) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (204) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (206) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (217) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (218) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (219) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (222) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (234) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (237) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (258) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (259) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (266) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (267) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (269) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (276) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (279) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (282) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (309) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (311) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (312) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (328) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (332) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (334) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (353) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (354) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (356) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (359) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (361) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (362) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (364) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (402) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (405) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (408) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (423) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (440) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (445) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (471) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (474) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (479) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (500) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (501) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (503) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (504) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (505) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (506) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (507) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (508) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (510) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (512) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (513) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (514) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (515) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (516) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (517) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (525) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (527) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (533) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (534) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (536) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (539) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (541) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (543) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (548) Motion for Leave to Appear ; denying (552) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (553) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (554) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (555) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (556) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP; denying (167) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (193) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (201) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09409-WHP; denying (75) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (76) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09410-WHP; denying (344) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (346) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (352) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (364) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (369) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (370) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09572-WHP; denying (126) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09592-WHP; denying (85) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09589-WHP; denying (178) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (179) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (180) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09590-WHP; denying (55) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09597-WHP; denying (108) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09595-WHP; denying (100) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (101) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09593-WHP; denying (140) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (151) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (152) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (153) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09586-WHP; denying (137) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09583-WHP; denying (212) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00061-WHP; denying (160) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (161) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (162) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00063-WHP; denying (430) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (431) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00064-WHP; denying (65) Motion for Leave to Appear in case 1:12-cv-00549-WHP; denying (47) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00554-WHP. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/14/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(ft)
February 14, 2012 Filing 381 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
February 14, 2012 Filing 380 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. William F. Thomas served on 6/18/2011, answer due 7/9/2011; Whittier Trust Company served on 6/14/2011, answer due 7/5/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
February 13, 2012 Filing 379 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Bank of the West served on 6/27/2011, answer due 7/18/2011; Charley Chunyu Lu & Biying Zhang Commercial Property served on 7/2/2011, answer due 7/23/2011; Directors Guild of America served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; First Republic Bank served on 6/27/2011, answer due 7/18/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
February 10, 2012 Filing 387 (REDACTED) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Bank of the West, Sharron R. Beard, Antoinette B. Brumbaugh, First Republic Bank. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company.(ft)
February 10, 2012 Filing 378 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
February 10, 2012 Filing 377 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TradeStation Group, Other Affiliate Monex Group, Inc. for TradeStation Securities, Inc.. Document filed by TradeStation Securities, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Jackson, Richard)
February 9, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Richard Bryan Jackson to RE-FILE Document (97 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 60 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 54 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 106 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 62 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 120 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 81 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 138 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 62 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 141 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 191 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 442 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 21 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 34 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 210 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 192 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 148 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 44 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 58 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 123 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 120 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 99 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 54 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 87 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 33 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 55 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 45 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 109 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 175 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 375 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 104 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 53 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 144 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 116 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 169 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 107 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 91 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 497 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 36 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 599 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 51 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were only added to 11-md-2296. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). NOTE: YOU MUST SELECT THE FILER FOR EACH INDIVIDUAL CASE Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lb)
February 9, 2012 Filing 376 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge William H. Pauley, III. Judge Richard J. Holwell is no longer assigned to the case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(sjo)
February 9, 2012 Filing 375 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TradeStation Group, Other Affiliate Monex Group, Inc. for TradeStation Securities, Inc.. Document filed by TradeStation Securities, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Jackson, Richard) Modified on 2/10/2012 (lb).
February 8, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Anthony C. Valiulis to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document No. [488 (in 11-md-2296, and all consolidated actions)] Motion Pro Hac Vice. This document is not filed via ECF. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(db)
February 8, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Shawn M. Staples to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document No. [487 (11-md-2296, and all consolidated actions)] Motion Pro Hac Vice. This document is not filed via ECF. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(db)
February 8, 2012 Filing 374 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION of Anthony C. Valiulis for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Valiulis, Anthony) Modified on 2/9/2012 (db).
February 8, 2012 Filing 373 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION of Shawn M. Staples for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Staples, Shawn) Modified on 2/9/2012 (db).
February 3, 2012 Filing 371 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank J Morales on behalf of Automotive Machinists Pension Trust Fund, MICHAEL HENDRICKSON, Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry, Michael Parmalee Welfare and Pension Administration Inc Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Morales, Frank)
February 2, 2012 Filing 368 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua W Mahoney on behalf of Stephen D. Carver (Mahoney, Joshua)
February 2, 2012 Filing 367 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maile Hitomi Solis on behalf of Stephen D. Carver (Solis, Maile)
February 2, 2012 Filing 366 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John R. McCambridge on behalf of Stephen D. Carver (McCambridge, John)
February 2, 2012 Filing 365 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George R Dougherty on behalf of Stephen D. Carver (Dougherty, George)
February 2, 2012 Filing 363 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent MB Financial, Inc. for MB Financial Bank, N.A.. Document filed by MB Financial Bank, N.A..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Dahl, James)
January 31, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney James A. Hinds to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Nos. #354 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #357 Proposed Order. These documents are NOT filed via ECF. (ldi)
January 31, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Stuart Libicki to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Nos. #358 and #359 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. These documents are NOT filed via ECF. (ldi)
January 31, 2012 Filing 360 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Abram D. Burnett III of K&L Gates LLP Harrisburg Office; Claudia A. Quiroz of K&L Gates LLP San Francisco Office; Edward P. Sangster and Leanne E. Hartmann of K&L Gates LLP San Francisco office; Ann Marie Arcadi and Clayton L. Falls of K&L Gates LLP Dallas office, New Attorney: Richard T. Miller and Robert T. Honeywell of K&L Gates LLP New York office, Address: K&L Gates LLP, 599 Lexington Avenue, New York, New York, USA 10022-6030, 212.536.3900. Document filed by BlackRock Institutional Trust, N.A.(in its capacity as trustee of its sponsorred and administered collective investment funds also known as Barclays Global Investors N.A.), Duquense university-equity federated investors inc., Federated Equity Income Fund, Inc., Federated Investors, Inc., Federated capital income fund, inc., Federated investment management, Federated mdt stock trust, Guidestone Equity Index Fund, Guidestone Funds, SA Funds Investment Trust. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09568-RJH, 1:11-cv-09572-RJH, 1:11-cv-09593-RJH, 1:11-cv-09598-RJH(Miller, Richard)
January 31, 2012 Filing 359 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION for Limited Admission PRO HAC VICE. Document filed by Southern California UFCWU & FE Joint Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Libicki, Stuart) Modified on 2/1/2012 (ldi).
January 31, 2012 Filing 358 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION for Limited Admission PRO HAC VICE. Document filed by California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Libicki, Stuart) Modified on 2/1/2012 (ldi).
January 31, 2012 Filing 357 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE of [Proposed] Order for Admissions Pro Hac Vice re: #354 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Lawrence H Burks. (Hinds, James) Modified on 2/1/2012 (ldi).
January 31, 2012 Filing 356 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiffs and or their counsel, hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice against the defendant Directors Guild of America. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/27/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09572-RJH (ab)
January 31, 2012 Filing 355 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and [Proposed] Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice served on all parties on 1/30/12. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Lawrence H Burks. (Hinds, James)
January 31, 2012 Filing 354 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Lawrence H Burks.(Hinds, James) Modified on 2/1/2012 (ldi).
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 372 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Please take notice that they law firm of Entwistle & Cappucci LLP hereby enters its appearance as proposed counsel for defendant Whittier Trust Company and the law firm of Loeb and Loeb LLP hereby withdraws as counsel of record for Whittier Trust Company. Whittier Trust Company hereby requests that all pleadings, notices, orders and other papers given or filed in the above-captioned matter be given and served upon the following person at the address, telephone number, and e-mail address indicated below: Vincent R. Cappucci, Esq. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/27/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09572-RJH(mro)
January 30, 2012 Filing 353 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian J Hurst on behalf of Southwest Securities Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Hurst, Brian)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER: The Letter identifies certain undecided motions filed in September seeking leave to amend the complaint or extension of the service period. These motions were pending in these consolidated actions before their transfer. These motions are exempt from the Court's December 28, 2011 order (the "Master Stay Order") staying the actions pending resolution of certain matters by Judge Kevin J. Carey, United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware. Six unopposed motions were filed in September. The period for opposition to these six motions has plainly expired. Accordingly, the court hereby GRANTS these six motions as set forth herein. The letter also identifies two September motions seeking leave to file an amended complaint, in which oppositions were entered. The Court has reviewed the opposition and reply filings, and finds that no oral argument is necessary. See Local Rule 6.1 (c). ("The parties and their attorneys shall only appear to argue the motion if so directed by the Court by order or by a Judge's Individual Practice.") Accordingly, the Court hereby GRANTS the following motions as set forth herein. The Letter also asks the court to grant twelve other motions to file amended complaints, filed on December 19, 2011 in the underlying actions. Because these actions were transferred to this court before the opposition period had expired, the Court will give defendants in the relevant actions two weeks from the date of this order to oppose the following motions; plaintiffs will have one week to reply. Opposition, if any, should be limited to the issue of granting leave to amend; arguments regarding jurisdiction should be reserved at this time. The Letter asks the Court to clarify portions of the Master Stay Order. The Court clarifies that the Master Stay Order does not prohibit plaintiffs from filing motions seeking (i) a further extension of the relevant service-related periods as may be necessary in any action; (ii) authorization to serve specified defendants by alternate means; and/or (iii) similar relief related to service issues. The Court further clarifies that the stay set forth in the Master Stay Order shall not automatically lift upon Judge Carey's resolution of plaintiffs' Stay Termination Motion of January 12, 2012 in the bankruptcy proceeding. Rather, should Judge Carey grant the Stay Termination Motion or otherwise indicate that the Court's stay should be lifted, the Court will schedule a conference to prepare an initial case management plan, with the opportunity for defendants to participate telephonically. No defendant will need to respond to any complaint or any stayed motion until a conference is held and a case management plan is entered. Rather, should Judge Carey grant the Stay Termination Motion or otherwise indicate that the Court's stay should be lifted, the Court will schedule a conference to prepare an initial case management plan, with the opportunity for defendants to participate telephonically. No defendant will need to respond to any complaint or any stayed motion until a conference is held and a case management plan is entered. defendants. Therefore, all parties filing motion papers (other than pro hac vice motions) must affirm that service of those papers is made on these pro se defendants by means other than ECF. Plaintiffs' counsel shall serve a copy of this order on all pro se defendants who appear in the case. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(djc) Modified on 2/1/2012 (djc).
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (98) Motion for Paul M. Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-md-02296-RJH; granting (345) Motion for Paul M. Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09572-RJH. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09572-RJH(djc)
January 27, 2012 Filing 351 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meghan E George on behalf of Southwest Securities Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(George, Meghan)
January 27, 2012 Filing 350 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Kennedy Dodds on behalf of Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios (Dodds, William)
January 26, 2012 Filing 349 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent T.Rowe Price Group, Inc. for T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc.. Document filed by T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09570-RJH, 1:11-cv-09572-RJH, 1:12-cv-00061-RJH(Elliott, Mark)
January 26, 2012 Filing 348 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Michael Elliott on behalf of T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09570-RJH, 1:11-cv-09572-RJH, 1:12-cv-00061-RJH(Elliott, Mark)
January 25, 2012 Filing 364 MOTION for Stanley W. Hodge to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Lucile M Dunn Ttee.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09572-RJH(bwa)
January 25, 2012 Filing 347 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ice Bear Incorporated.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Haider, Shan)
January 24, 2012 Filing 369 MOTION for Ellen K. Wolf to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Bernard Shapiro, Rena Shapiro(individually and as a Trustee of FBO Bernard and Rena Shapiro Intervivos Trust A/C #1 DTD 10/15/87), Rena Shapiro(individually and as a Trustee of FBO Bernard and Rena Shapiro Intervivos Trust A/C #` DTD 10/15/87).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09572-RJH(bwa)
January 23, 2012 Filing 346 MOTION for Lawrence M. Cirelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by State of California, Department of Personnel Administration, Savings Plus Plan.(pgu)
January 19, 2012 Filing 345 MOTION for Paul M. Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Iris B. Mahoney, Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of the Iris B. Mahoney REV TR U/A/D 04/10/98), Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of U/W/O Paul P Mahoney DTD 12/28/1978).(pgu)
January 18, 2012 Filing 352 MOTION for Pamela Koslyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Mark Domas.(bwa)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER REGARDING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION: All attorneys appearing in these cases must be admitted to practice in this court in accordance with Local Civil Rule 1.3. Attorneys seeking admission pro hac vice should follow the Court's instructions at http:www.nysd.uscourts.gov/pro_hac.php with the following exceptions: 1) Service of the motion on all parties is not required. 2) An admission fee is not required. 3) An ECF password may be obtained before pro hac vice admission is granted. Where the online application requires an admission date, applicants may use the date on which they first entered their appearance in the case. For assistance with the ECF tiling system, or with applying for admission pro hac vice, counsel may contact the Court's ECF Help Desk at 212-805-0800. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/12/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(mro)
January 10, 2012 Filing 370 MOTION for John T. Cu to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by State of California - Mid Cap Value, State of California, Department of Personnel Administration, Savings Plus Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09572-RJH(bwa) Modified on 2/9/2012 (bwa).
January 10, 2012 Filing 344 MOTION for Walter R. Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by First Republic Bank.(pgu)
January 9, 2012 Filing 342 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey J. Mayer on behalf of E. Donald Heymann (Mayer, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2012 Filing 341 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for the Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 4, 2012 Filing 340 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sanford H. Greenberg on behalf of E. Donald Heymann. New Address: Greenberg Freeman LLP, 110 East 59th Street, 22nd Floor, New York, New York, USA 10022, (212) 838-9738. (Greenberg, Sanford)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER: The court wishes to facilitate the filing of documents under seal in all cases that are, or will be, consolidated in this matter, in which a protective order was previously entered. Accordingly, the court hereby adopts in each such case any protective order which was in effect at the time of transfer. The court will provide a supplemental order identifying the adopted protective orders by docket number once all case dockets have been fully transferred to this court. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(lmb)
January 4, 2012 Filing 338 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sanford H. Greenberg on behalf of E. Donald Heymann. New Address: Greenberg Freeman LLP, 110 East 59th Street, 22nd Floor, New York, New York, USA 10022, 212 838 9738. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09572-RJH(Greenberg, Sanford)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER: Pursuant to Standing Order M10-468, many of the cases in the above- captioned multidistrict litigation have been automatically designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the "Pilot Project"). However, because this court has stayed nearly all discovery and motion practice in these cases (see Order of December 28,2011 (the "Stay")), inclusion in the Pilot Project would be inappropriate. The court hereby designates that these cases shall not be included in the Pilot Project at this time. The court will revisit inclusion upon further order from this court or from the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware lifting the Stay. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(lmb)
January 4, 2012 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: (135 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJH) Order, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(lmb)
January 3, 2012 Filing 336 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sanford H. Greenberg on behalf of E. Donald Heymann Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-09572-RJH(Greenberg, Sanford)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 335 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. Filed In Associated Cases:1:11-cv-09572-RJH, 1:11-md-02296-RJH. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo)
December 29, 2011 Filing 334 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Northern; Case Number: 4:11-cv-02634. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
December 29, 2011 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:11-md-02296-RJH. (sjo)
December 29, 2011 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:11-md-02296-RJH. (sjo)
December 29, 2011 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. (sjo)
December 29, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
December 29, 2011 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
December 20, 2011 Filing 333 TRANSFER ORDER MDL-2296: Transferring case to the U.S. District Court, Southern District of New York. Signed by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, on 12/20/2011. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
December 19, 2011 Filing 332 MOTION for Leave to File [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #5 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/19/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
December 15, 2011 Filing 331 Certificate of Interested Entities by Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios (DiPerna, Mark) (Filed on 12/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
December 15, 2011 Filing 330 Certificate of Interested Entities by Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income (DiPerna, Mark) (Filed on 12/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
December 15, 2011 Filing 329 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P DiPerna (DiPerna, Mark) (Filed on 12/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
December 9, 2011 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of JOANNE DESHEROW SANGER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A TRUSTEE OF THE U/A DTA 03/29/04 JOANNE DESHEROW SANGER LIVTR (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 12/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
December 5, 2011 Filing 327 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Peter A. Young (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
December 5, 2011 Filing 326 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios served on 11/18/2011, answer due 12/9/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
December 5, 2011 Filing 325 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value served on 11/18/2011, answer due 12/9/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
December 5, 2011 Filing 324 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income served on 9/18/2011, answer due 10/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
December 5, 2011 Filing 323 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #327 . *** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Peter A. Young served on 9/18/2011, answer due 10/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011) Modified on 12/5/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
December 5, 2011 Filing 322 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. E. Donald Heymann served on 9/18/2011, answer due 10/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
December 5, 2011 Filing 321 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. John A. Orb Jr. served on 9/18/2011, answer due 10/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
December 5, 2011 Filing 320 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Robert Ramsey served on 9/18/2011, answer due 10/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
December 5, 2011 Filing 319 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Sherry P. Broder(an individual) served on 9/18/2011, answer due 10/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
December 5, 2011 Filing 318 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Francis G. Duggan served on 9/18/2011, answer due 10/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 317 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Kaufman Wolf on behalf of Bernard and Rena Shapiro (Wolf, Ellen) (Filed on 11/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
November 22, 2011 Filing 316 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne Ellen Irving (Irving, Jeanne) (Filed on 11/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #309 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey J. Mayer. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying #301 #312 Request for Permission to E-file (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2011: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (nah, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
November 17, 2011 Receipt in the amount of $305.00 for #309 Application for Pro hac vice, receipt no. 34611067083. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
November 16, 2011 Filing 313 Answer to Second Amended Complaint byPeter A. Young. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011) Modified on 11/22/2011 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
November 14, 2011 Filing 312 MOTION For Permission to Efile filed by Peter A. Young. Responses due by 11/28/2011. Replies due by 12/5/2011. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
November 14, 2011 Filing 311 Letter from Peter Young dated 11/9/2011 re: efiling requirements. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
November 14, 2011 Filing 310 NOTICE of Appearance of Jeffrey J. Mayer filed by E. Donald Heymann (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for #309 Pro Hac Vice application)(Baskin, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/14/2011) Modified on 11/15/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
November 14, 2011 Filing 309 Motion of Jeffrey J. Mayer for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice by E. Donald Heymann. (Baskin, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/14/2011) Modified on 11/15/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $305.00, receipt no. 34611067083 Modified on 11/21/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
November 7, 2011 Filing 308 NOTICE of Appearance Nancy L. Mac Donald, William D. Mac Donald (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
November 7, 2011 Filing 307 Letter from Nancy MacDonald dated 10/11/2011 re: Notice of Appearance. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER RE EFILING REQUIREMENTS FOR PRO SE DEFENDANTS re #301 MOTION For Permission to Efile filed by Peter A. Young. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/2/11. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 31, 2011 Filing 305 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Allen Baskin obo E. Donald Heymann, indv and as Trustee of E. Donald Heymann Trust (Baskin, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT MELISSA MA re #295 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/25/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #300 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Deborah Jill Newman. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #299 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Alan J. Stone. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 24, 2011 Filing 301 MOTION For Permission to Efile filed by Peter A. Young. Responses due by 11/7/2011. Replies due by 11/14/2011. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 19, 2011 Filing 300 MOTION of Deborah Jill Newman for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007784.) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 19, 2011 Filing 299 MOTION of Alan J. Stone for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007787.) filed by Union Bank of California N.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 19, 2011 Filing 298 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Hoke Bergman by Defendants John Pritzker and Lisa Pritzker (Bergman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/19/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 18, 2011 Filing 297 Notice of Withdrawal of #288 Joinder to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of the Iris B. Mahoney REV TR U/A/D 04/10/98). (Mahoney, Paul) (Filed on 10/18/2011) Modified on 10/19/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 18, 2011 Filing 296 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF #286 OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Debra A. Gastler, Mark Allen Itkin, Nancy Lobdell, Renee H. Miller, Durham J. Monsma, Robbie E. Monsma, William F. Thomas (Neubauer, Mark) (Filed on 10/18/2011) Modified on 10/19/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 18, 2011 Filing 295 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Melissa Ma by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Agreement to Voluntary Dismissal of Melissa Ma)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 10/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 14, 2011 Filing 294 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lucile M. Dunn (Hodge, Stanley) (Filed on 10/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 14, 2011 Filing 293 NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley William Hodge (Hodge, Stanley) (Filed on 10/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 14, 2011 Filing 292 NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley William Hodge (Hodge, Stanley) (Filed on 10/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 13, 2011 Filing 291 Certificate of Interested Entities by Union Bank of California N.A., identifying Corporate Parent Union Bank, N.A., Other Affiliate UnionbanCal Corporation, Other Affiliate Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ for Union Bank of California N.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Saelao, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 13, 2011 Filing 290 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Snavely Saelao (Attachments: #1 Certificte of Service)(Saelao, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting #263 Plaintiff's Request to E-File (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2011: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (nah, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 12, 2011 Filing 288 Joinder to #286 Opposition filed by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of U/W/O Paul P Mahoney DTD 12/28/1978). (Mahoney, Paul) (Filed on 10/12/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 12, 2011 Filing 287 Joinder to #286 Opposition filed by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Iris B. Mahoney. (Mahoney, Paul) (Filed on 10/12/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 11, 2011 Filing 286 RESPONSE (re #256 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ) filed byDebra A. Gastler, Mark Allen Itkin, Nancy Lobdell, Renee H. Miller, Durham J. Monsma, Robbie E. Monsma, William F. Thomas. (Neubauer, Mark) (Filed on 10/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 11, 2011 Filing 285 Statement of Non-Opposition to #256 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by First Republic Bank. (Schneider, Walter) (Filed on 10/11/2011) Modified on 10/12/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 11, 2011 Filing 284 Statement of Non-Opposition re #256 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed byState of California, Department of Personnel Administration, Savings Plus Plan. (Related document(s) #256 ) (Cu, John) (Filed on 10/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 7, 2011 Filing 283 Letter from Warren J. Eide dated 10/4/2011 re efiling requirements. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2011: #1 Envelope) (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO SET PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR A NOVEMBER HEARING DATE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying #257 Motion for Hearing (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 7, 2011 Filing 279 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Hoke Bergman for Defendant Verna R. Harrah (Bergman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 6, 2011 Filing 278 Certificate of Interested Entities by PG&E Postretirment Medical Plan TR (Firestein, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 6, 2011 Filing 277 Certificate of Interested Entities by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc (DiPerna, Mark) (Filed on 10/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 6, 2011 Filing 276 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monumental Life Insurance Company (DiPerna, Mark) (Filed on 10/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 6, 2011 Filing 275 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P DiPerna for CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. (DiPerna, Mark) (Filed on 10/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 6, 2011 Filing 274 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P DiPerna for MONUMENTAL LIFE INSURANCE CO. (DiPerna, Mark) (Filed on 10/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 4, 2011 Filing 273 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Greenstone APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Defendant Miriam A. Pawel (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Greenstone, Ellen) (Filed on 10/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #253 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Hal Neier. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 3, 2011 Filing 271 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #264 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief to Extend Time for Service of Summons and Complaint (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 10/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #252 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Amy C. Brown. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #251 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Ricardo Solano, Jr. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 30, 2011 Filing 268 Certificate of Interested Entities by Crowell Weedon & Co. (Glos, Christopher) (Filed on 9/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 30, 2011 Filing 267 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Darin Glos on behalf of Defendant Crowell, Weedon & Co. (Glos, Christopher) (Filed on 9/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER RE E-FILING REQUIREMENTS FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS re #263 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Warren J. Eide. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/30/11. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER GRANTING CHANGE IN PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL re #258 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/30/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #232 Motion (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 29, 2011 Filing 263 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Warren J. Eide. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 29, 2011 Filing 262 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #257 MOTION for Hearing re #256 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint MOTION FOR NOVEMBER HEARING DATE MOTION for Hearing re #256 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint MOTION FOR NOVEMBER HEARING DATE, #256 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, 260 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and Future Documents Containing Confidential Shareholder Information, #258 Notice of Change In Counsel, #261 MOTION for Leave to File to File Amended Complaint Against Defendants Richard and Despina Haigler (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/29/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 29, 2011 Filing 261 MOTION for Leave to File to File Amended Complaint Against Defendants Richard and Despina Haigler filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/29/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 28, 2011 Filing 259 NOTICE of Appearance of Michael Allen Firestein as Counsel, filed by PG&E Postretirement Medical Plan TR (Firestein, Michael) (Filed on 9/28/2011) Modified on 9/30/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 27, 2011 Filing 258 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Julia Ingrid DeBeers as Against Defendants SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom and SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decommissioning Trust Partnership and [Proposed] Order (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/27/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 27, 2011 Filing 257 MOTION for Hearing re #256 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint MOTION FOR NOVEMBER HEARING DATE filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/27/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 27, 2011 Filing 256 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julia I. De Beers, #2 [Proposed] Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit A to Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit B to Second Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit C to Second Amended Complaint, #6 Proposed Order)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/27/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 27, 2011 Filing 255 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Omar F. Johnson Jr. re #254 Notice of Appearance NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE (Schafer, John) (Filed on 9/27/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 27, 2011 Filing 254 NOTICE of Appearance by John Paulo Schafer NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE (Schafer, John) (Filed on 9/27/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 26, 2011 Filing 253 MOTION of Hal Neier for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007646.) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 26, 2011 Filing 252 MOTION of Amy Brown for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007645.) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 26, 2011 Filing 251 MOTION of Ricardo Solano Jr. for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007644.) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 21, 2011 Filing 250 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company Personal Service on Defendant City National Bank (Larsen, Melodie) (Filed on 9/21/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 21, 2011 Filing 249 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company Personal Service on Defendant Union Bank of California N.A. (Larsen, Melodie) (Filed on 9/21/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 20, 2011 Filing 248 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Service waived by Alfred V. Tjarks waiver sent on 9/16/2011, answer due 11/15/2011; Alfred V. Tjarks Jr. waiver sent on 9/16/2011, answer due 11/15/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 15, 2011 Filing 247 RESPONSE to and joinder in opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Transfer For Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings in MDL Case No. 2296 by Carol Askin, Richard Askin. (Kohlbrand, Richard) (Filed on 9/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 14, 2011 Filing 246 NOTICE of Appearance filed by James A. Friedberg (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 14, 2011 Filing 245 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Franklin Friedberg individually and as co-trustee of the Administrative Trust Under the Herman R. Friedberg Revocable Trust (Friedberg, Thomas) (Filed on 9/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 13, 2011 Filing 244 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #242 Renotice motion hearing, Moved from October 19, 2011 to November 9, 2011 (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 13, 2011 Filing 243 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Lee Marcus of Defendants ALFRED V. TJARKS, AN INDIVIDUAL AND ALFRED V. TJARKS JR., AS TRUSTEE OF THE ALFRED V. TJARKS RETIREMENT PLAN DTD 02/18/85 (Marcus, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 12, 2011 Filing 242 Renotice motion hearing re #232 MOTION to Extend Time for Service of Summons and Complaint Moved From October 19, 2011 to November 9, 2011 filed byDeutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Related document(s) #232 ) (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 12, 2011 Filing 241 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #232 MOTION to Extend Time for Service of Summons and Complaint (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 12, 2011 Filing 240 NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Angelica Quiroz NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CLAUDIA A. QUIROZ (Quiroz, Claudia) (Filed on 9/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 12, 2011 Filing 239 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Paul Brezine, Esq (Brezine, Adam) (Filed on 9/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 12, 2011 Filing 238 Certificate of Interested Entities by SA Funds Investment Trust identifying Corporate Parent SA Funds Investment Trust for SA Funds Investment Trust. DEFENDANT SA FUNDS-INVESTMENT TRUST'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Quiroz, Claudia) (Filed on 9/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 12, 2011 Filing 237 NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Angelica Quiroz NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF EDWARD P. SANGSTER (Quiroz, Claudia) (Filed on 9/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 12, 2011 Filing 236 Certificate of Interested Entities by Board of Administration of the Water and Power Employees' Retirement Plan, incorrectly named as "Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV" and "Water identifying Corporate Parent Tribune Company for Board of Administration of the Water and Power Employees' Retirement Plan, incorrectly named as "Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV" and "Water. (Loeb, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 12, 2011 Filing 235 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Alan Loeb for Defendant Board of Administration of the Water and Power Employees' Retirement Plan, incorrectly named as "Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV" and "Water and Power Employee's Ret. Disab. & Death Benefits Ins. Plan" (Loeb, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 12, 2011 Filing 234 NOTICE of Appearance by Sabina Clorfeine (Clorfeine, Sabina) (Filed on 9/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 12, 2011 Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Olecki (Olecki, Michael) (Filed on 9/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 9, 2011 Filing 232 MOTION to Extend Time for Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 9/23/2011. Replies due by 9/30/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 9, 2011 Filing 231 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L Klein for Catherine Verdusco individually and as the Trustee of the Benjamin Verdusco and Francesca Verdusco Trusts (Klein, Michael) (Filed on 9/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 9, 2011 Filing 230 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L Klein for Jeffrey Appleby individually and as Trustee of the Christopher Appleby, Felicity Appleby and James Polk Trusts (Klein, Michael) (Filed on 9/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 9, 2011 Filing 229 NOTICE of Appearance by John Lance Erikson, Jr (Defendant Wedbush Securities Inc., formerly known as Wedbush Morgan Securities, Inc.) (Erikson, John) (Filed on 9/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 9, 2011 Filing 228 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Neubauer on behalf of Defendant Mark Allen Itkin (Neubauer, Mark) (Filed on 9/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 8, 2011 Filing 227 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Kohlbrand for Carol Askin and Richard Askin (Kohlbrand, Richard) (Filed on 9/8/2011) Modified on 9/9/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 8, 2011 Filing 226 FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT #227 FOR CORRECT ENTRY.NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Kohlbrand for Carol Askin (Kohlbrand, Richard) (Filed on 9/8/2011) Modified on 9/9/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 8, 2011 Filing 225 FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT #227 FOR CORRECT ENTRY.NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Kohlbrand (Kohlbrand, Richard) (Filed on 9/8/2011) Modified on 9/9/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 8, 2011 Filing 224 FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT #227 FOR CORRECT ENTRY.NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Kohlbrand (Kohlbrand, Richard) (Filed on 9/8/2011) Modified on 9/9/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 8, 2011 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of Rodolfo V. Gil (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 9/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 8, 2011 Filing 222 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony P. Fritz for Mary Kathllen McNulty, individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Wayne McNulty (Deceased) (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fritz, Anthony) (Filed on 9/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 8, 2011 Filing 221 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Jens Frederick Smith (Smith, Michael) (Filed on 9/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 8, 2011 Filing 220 Certificate of Interested Entities by First Republic Bank (Schneider, Walter) (Filed on 9/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 8, 2011 Filing 219 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Raymond Schneider by First Republic Bank (Schneider, Walter) (Filed on 9/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 8, 2011 Filing 218 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (document 217 ) (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 8, 2011 Filing 217 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Javad Rassouli (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 8, 2011 Filing 216 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas James Van Brunt on behalf of Whittier Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Van Brunt, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 8, 2011 Filing 215 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Michael Mahoney as Trustee U/W/O Paul P. Mahoney DTD 12/28/1978 (Mahoney, Paul) (Filed on 9/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 8, 2011 Filing 214 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Michael Mahoney Individually and as Trustee (Mahoney, Paul) (Filed on 9/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 7, 2011 Filing 213 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Cu on behalf of State of California, Department of Personnel Administration, Savings Plus Plan (Cu, John) (Filed on 9/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 7, 2011 Filing 211 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Neubauer on behalf of Defendants Durham J. Monsma, Robbie E. Monsma, Debra A. Gastler, Nancy Lobdell, Renee H. Miller, and William F. Thomas (Neubauer, Mark) (Filed on 9/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 6, 2011 Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance by Danica F. Hughes, Mark A. Hughes (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 6, 2011 Filing 210 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna Lynn Kirchner (Kirchner, Donna) (Filed on 9/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 2, 2011 Filing 209 Pro Se NOTICE of Appearance S Keating Rhoads (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 2, 2011 Filing 208 Pro Se NOTICE of Appearance Carol Rhoads (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 2, 2011 Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Julian Newman (Newman, Stephen) (Filed on 9/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 2, 2011 Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Hoke Bergman for Will K. Weinstein and Diane Buchanan Wilsey (Bergman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 2, 2011 Filing 204 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #195 Notice of Appearance (Larsen, Melodie) (Filed on 9/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 207 Pro Se NOTICE of Appearance by Warren J. Eide (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 203 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Barbro Osher served on 6/25/2011, answer due 7/18/2011; Bernard Osher served on 6/25/2011, answer due 7/18/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/1/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 31, 2011 Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne T. Lamprey for Joseph Fee (Lamprey, Wayne) (Filed on 8/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 31, 2011 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by James Wade Poindexter by Florence S. Bradshaw (Poindexter, James) (Filed on 8/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 31, 2011 Filing 200 NOTICE of Appearance by James Wade Poindexter By Defendants Richard S. Arnold and San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Company (Poindexter, James) (Filed on 8/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 30, 2011 Filing 199 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of Imogene S. Peckham, Individually and as a Trustee of U/AD 0714-2000 FBO THE 2000 Peckham Family Trust (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 8/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 30, 2011 Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of George J. Peckham, individually and as a Trustee of U/AD 07-14-2000 1-B0 THE 2000 Peckham Family Trust (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 8/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 30, 2011 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of Spencer W. Beard (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 8/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 30, 2011 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of Sharron R. Beard (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 8/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 30, 2011 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Melodie Kay Larsen and Allan E. Ceran (Larsen, Melodie) (Filed on 8/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 29, 2011 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by Raja M.G. Sekaran (Sekaran, Raja) (Filed on 8/29/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER RE NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COUNSEL AS TO SOME DEFENDANTS re #184 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/29/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 25, 2011 Filing 192 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Omar F. Johnson Jr. served on 8/22/2011, answer due 9/12/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 25, 2011 Filing 191 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Chase L. Leavitt served on 8/17/2011, answer due 9/7/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 25, 2011 Filing 190 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File document 189 . (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 25, 2011 Filing 188 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #185 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, AMENDED (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 25, 2011 Filing 187 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #184 Notice of Change In Counsel AMENDED (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 25, 2011 Filing 186 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #183 Stipulation, AMENDED (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 24, 2011 Filing 185 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Betty Ann Altman, John M. Altman, Jeffrey J. Appleby, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, Archdiocese of Los Angeles Lay Employee Pension Plan, Richard S. Arnold, Carol Askin, Richard Askin, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Jacqueline E. Autry, Susan Babcock, Bank of The West, Donald Baron, Irene Baron, Betty Beaird, Sharron R. Beard, Spencer W. Beard, William J. Bell, Jill E. Berube, Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Jr University, Florence S. Bradshaw, Sherry Broder(individually and as a Trustee of Sherry P. Broder U/A DTD 1/1/94), Sherry P. Broder(an individual), Robert J. Brookes, Antoinette B. Brumbaugh, George William Buck, Lawrence H Burks, California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust, Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Carpenters Pension Trust for Northern California, Stephen D. Carver, Catholic Health West CHW, Catholic Healthcare West CHW, Frances L. Cey, Ronald C. Cey, Chandis Securities Company, Jeffrey Chandler, Eric I. Chang, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc, Charley Chunyu Lu & Biying Zhang Commercial Property, City National Bank, Herbert Anthony Clark, Jr., Tommie L. Cordero, Crowell Weedon & Co., Derek M. Dalton, Karen E. Dalton, Directors Guild of America, Directors Guild of America Producer Pension Trust, Doheney Eye Institute, Quinn Martin Dolan, Mark Domas, Francis G. Duggan, Jeanette M. Duggan, Michael W. Dunaway, Trudy V. Dunaway, Lucile M. Dunn, James H. Eckhouse, Jill E. Eckhouse, Warren J. Eide, Everything Medical, Inc., Joseph M. Fee, Bernadette Fingleton, First Republic Bank, John E. Flick, Lois L. Flick, James A. Friedberg, Thomas F. Friedberg, Camilla Chandler Frost, Debra A. Gastler, Rodolfo V. Gil, Roger Goodan, Helen Grossman, Karen Hammond, Paul Theodore Hammond, Verna R. Harrah, Herbert G. Lau Profit Sharing QRP Participation, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., E. Donald Heymann, Leonard F. Hill, Danica F. Hughes, Mark A. Hughes, Mark Allen Itkin, Nancy Fay Johnson, Omar F. Johnson Jr., Kaiser Foundation Health, Kaiser Foundation Health Plans and Hospital, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Patricia Kaszton, William Kaszton, Jonathan Gary Keith, Joe Youssry Kelada, John Lanfranki, Virginia Lanfranki, Chase L. Leavitt, Nancy Lobdell, Robert C. Lobdell, Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV, Charley Chunyu Lu, Melissa Ma, Nancy L. Mac Donald, William D. Mac Donald, Iris B. Mahoney, Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of the Iris B. Mahoney REV TR U/A/D 04/10/98), Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of U/W/O Paul P Mahoney DTD 12/28/1978), Irene M. McNulty, Mary Kathleen McNulty, Wayne F. McNulty, Alfred W. Merkel, Marlowe G. Merkel, Renee H. Miller, Durham J. Monsma, Robbie E. Monsma, Melissa A Monson, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Eric Morris, Robert D. Nelson, Ynez Viole O'Neill, Janice Fay Johnson Ochs, Omers Pension Fund, John A. Orb, John A. Orb Jr., Barbro Osher, Bernard Osher, PG&E Postretirment Medical Plan TR, Miriam A. Pawel, George J. Peckham, Imogene S. Peckham, Michael Plonski, Nedra Plonski, John Pritzker, Lisa Pritzker, Carl Zlatchin Profit, Qualified CPUC Decom Master TR, RWB, Irving Rabin, Varda Rabin, Rabin Worldwide, Inc., Nancy D. Ramage, Gelert R. Ramage, Jr., Robert Ramsey, Javad Rassouli, Remdel Brothers, Daniel H. Renberg, Carol Rhoads, S Keating Rhoads, Enzo S. Ricciardelli, Roman Catholic Archbishop LA, Claude Rosenberg, Louise Rosenberg, SA Funds Investment Trust, SC Edison Nuclear Facilities, SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom, Sacramento County Emp Ret System, Sacramento County Ret Association, San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co., Joanne Desherow Sanger, Mark I. Seiden, Susan H. Shane, Bernard Shapiro, Rena Shapiro, Southern California UFCWU & FE Joint Pension Trust Fund, Starbuck, Tisdale & Associates, State of California - Mid Cap Value, State of California, Department of Personnel Administration, Savings Plus Plan, Randy Steiner(an individual), Douglas B. Stewart, John W. Stewart II, William Stinehart Jr.(individually and as a Trustee of Chandler Trust No. 1 and Chandler Trust No. 2), William Stinehart Jr.(an individual), Kevin Stone, Vern M. Strickler, T.Rowe Price, Lori Ann Talarico, Teamsters Separate Account, The Whittier Trust Company, William F. Thomas, Alfred V. Tjarks, Alfred V. Tjarks Jr., Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios, Union Bank of California N.A.,, Catherine A. Verdusco, Lolita K. Wagner, Water and Power Employee's Ret. Disab. & Death Benefit Ins. Plan, Laurie H. Weaver, Judy C. Webb, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Inc., Will K. Weinstein, Nicholas H. Werthman, Warren B. Williamson, Diane Buchanan Wilsey, Peter A. Young, Biying Zhang, Betty K Zlatchin, zoological Society of San Diego, a California. Filed byDeutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/24/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 24, 2011 Filing 184 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Julia Ingrid DeBeers for Some Defendants and [Proposed] Order (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/24/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 24, 2011 Filing 183 STIPULATION Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Lawrence H. Burks Permitting Plaintiffs to File a First Amended Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/24/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 23, 2011 Filing 189 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Nancy D. Ramage (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 23, 2011 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of Vern M. Strickler (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 8/23/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 23, 2011 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of William Kaszton, Individually and as Trustee of UAD 10/23/97 by Kaszton Family Trust (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 8/23/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 23, 2011 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of Patricia Kaszton, Individually and as a Trustee UAD 10/23/97 by Kaszton Family Trust (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 8/23/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 17, 2011 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Koslyn (Koslyn, Pamela) (Filed on 8/17/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 17, 2011 Filing 178 NOTICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company OF FILING OF MOTION TO TRANSFER BEFORE THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION (Attachments: #1 Motion to Transfer, #2 Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer, #3 Declaration of David M. Zensky, #4 Schedule of Actions, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/17/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 15, 2011 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremiah Tracy Reynolds and Dale Kinsella of Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert LLP (Reynolds, Jeremiah) (Filed on 8/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 12, 2011 Filing 176 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #175 Order on Motion to Stay (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 175 REVISED ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' REVISED MOTION FOR STAY AS FURTHER MODIFIED BY THE COURT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #81 Motion to Stay (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 12, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated pursuant to #175 Order on Motion to Stay. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 10, 2011 Filing 174 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. John W. Stewart II served on 7/24/2011, answer due 8/15/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/10/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 10, 2011 Filing 173 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Herbert G. Lau Profit Sharing QRP Participation served on 7/21/2011, answer due 8/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/10/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 10, 2011 Filing 172 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Diane Buchanan Wilsey served on 7/28/2011, answer due 8/18/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/10/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 10, 2011 Filing 171 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Joanne Desherow Sanger served on 6/19/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Lolita K. Wagner served on 6/19/2011, answer due 7/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/10/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 9, 2011 Filing 170 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Richard S. Arnold served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Betty Beaird served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Florence S. Bradshaw served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; George William Buck served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Camilla Chandler Family Foundation served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Stephen D. Carver served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Frances L. Cey served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Ronald C. Cey served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Chandis Securities Company served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Doheney Eye Institute served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Lucile M. Dunn served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; James A. Friedberg served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Thomas F. Friedberg served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Camilla Chandler Frost served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Rodolfo V. Gil served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Karen Hammond served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Paul Theodore Hammond served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Danica F. Hughes served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Mark A. Hughes served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Mark Allen Itkin served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Durham J. Monsma served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Robbie E. Monsma served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Barbro Osher served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Bernard Osher served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Miriam A. Pawel served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co. served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Warren B. Williamson served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 5, 2011 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter J.R. Traver for Def. Bank of the West (Traver, Walter) (Filed on 8/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 4, 2011 Filing 168 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Nancy Ramage to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 3, 2011 Filing 167 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Jacqueline E. Autry served on 7/6/2011, answer due 7/27/2011; Leonard F. Hill served on 7/6/2011, answer due 7/27/2011. Janice Fay Johnson served on 7/6/2011, answer due 7/27/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 3, 2011 Filing 166 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Debra A. Gastler served on 7/5/2011, answer due 7/26/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 3, 2011 Filing 165 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Charley Chunyu Lu served on 7/2/2011, answer due 7/25/2011; Nancy L. Mac Donald served on 7/2/2011, answer due 7/25/2011; Biying Zhang served on 7/2/2011, answer due 7/25/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 3, 2011 Filing 164 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Melissa Ma served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Omers Pension Fund served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Carl Zlatchin Profit served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Irving Rabin served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Varda Rabin served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Rabin Worldwide, Inc. served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Claude Rosenberg served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Louise Rosenberg served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Bernard Shapiro served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Rena Shapiro served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Lori Ann Talarico served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Betty K Zlatchin served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 3, 2011 Filing 163 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Jr University served on 6/28/2011, answer due 7/19/2011; Nancy Lobdell served on 6/28/2011, answer due 7/19/2011; Mary Kathleen McNulty served on 6/28/2011, answer due 7/19/2011; John Pritzker served on 6/28/2011, answer due 7/19/2011; Lisa Pritzker served on 6/28/2011, answer due 7/19/2011; Catherine A. Verdusco served on 6/28/2011, answer due 7/19/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 3, 2011 Filing 162 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company. Antoinette B. Brumbaugh served on 6/27/2011, answer due 7/18/2011; Catholic Healthcare West CHW served on 6/27/2011, answer due 7/18/2011; Melissa A Monson served on 6/27/2011, answer due 7/18/2011; Kevin Stone served on 6/27/2011, answer due 7/18/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 3, 2011 Filing 161 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. William J. Bell served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; Eric I. Chang served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; Warren J. Eide served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; Joseph M. Fee served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; Despina Haigler served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; Richard Haigler served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; RWB served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; Daniel H. Renberg served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; Mark I. Seiden served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; Susan H. Shane served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 3, 2011 Filing 160 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Betty Ann Altman served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; John M. Altman served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Quinn Martin Dolan served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; First Republic Bank served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; John E. Flick served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Lois L. Flick served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Helen Grossman served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Kaiser Foundation Health served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Kaiser Foundation Health Plans and Hospital served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Kaiser Foundation Hospitals served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Joe Youssry Kelada served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Sacramento County Emp Ret System served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Sacramento County Ret Association served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Starbuck, Tisdale & Associates served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; State of California - Mid Cap Value served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Douglas B. Stewart served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Laurie H. Weaver served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 3, 2011 Filing 159 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Carol Askin served on 6/22/2011, answer due 7/13/2011; Richard Askin served on 6/22/2011, answer due 7/13/2011; Sharron R. Beard served on 6/22/2011, answer due 7/13/2011; Spencer W. Beard served on 6/22/2011, answer due 7/13/2011; Herbert Anthony Clark, Jr. served on 6/22/2011, answer due 7/13/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 2, 2011 Filing 158 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Derek M. Dalton served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Karen E. Dalton served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Mark Domas served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Michael W. Dunaway served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Trudy V. Dunaway served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Everything Medical, Inc. served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Jonathan Gary Keith served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Marlowe G. Merkel served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Carol Rhoads served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; S Keating Rhoads served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 2, 2011 Filing 157 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Jill E. Berube served on 6/18/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Robert J. Brookes served on 6/18/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; James H. Eckhouse served on 6/18/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Jill E. Eckhouse served on 6/18/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Ynez Viole O'Neill served on 6/18/2011, answer due 7/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 2, 2011 Filing 156 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Lawrence H Burks served on 6/17/2011, answer due 7/8/2011; Patricia Kaszton served on 6/17/2011, answer due 7/8/2011; William Kaszton served on 6/17/2011, answer due 7/8/2011; George J. Peckham served on 6/17/2011, answer due 7/8/2011; Imogene S. Peckham served on 6/17/2011, answer due 7/8/2011; Southern California UFCWU & FE Joint Pension Trust Fund served on 6/17/2011, answer due 7/8/2011; Vern M. Strickler served on 6/17/2011, answer due 7/8/2011; T.Rowe Price served on 6/17/2011, answer due 7/8/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 2, 2011 Filing 155 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Jeffrey J. Appleby served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Archdiocese of Los Angeles served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Archdiocese of Los Angeles Lay Employee Pension Plan served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Bank of The West served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Donald Baron served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Irene Baron served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Charles Schwab & Co., Inc served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Crowell Weedon & Co. served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Directors Guild of America served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Directors Guild of America Producer Pension Trust served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Verna R. Harrah served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Monumental Life Insurance Company served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Robert D. Nelson served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Michael Plonski served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Nedra Plonski served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Roman Catholic Archbishop LA served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Randy Steiner(an individual) served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Water and Power Employee's Ret. Disab. & Death Benefit Ins. Plan served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Wedbush Morgan Securities, Inc. served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; zoological Society of San Diego, a California served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 2, 2011 Filing 154 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Bernadette Fingleton served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011; Iris B. Mahoney served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011; Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of the Iris B. Mahoney REV TR U/A/D 04/10/98) served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011; Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of U/W/O Paul P Mahoney DTD 12/28/1978) served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011; Renee H. Miller served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011; Qualified CPUC Decom Master TR served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011; SC Edison Nuclear Facilities served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 2, 2011 Filing 153 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Whittier Trust Company to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
August 2, 2011 Filing 152 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Lori Ann Talarico. (Bergman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 29, 2011 Filing 151 RESPONSE (re #81 MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court ) filed by Lawrence H Burks. (Hinds, James) (Filed on 7/29/2011) Modified on 8/1/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 29, 2011 Filing 150 Statement of Non-Opposition re #81 MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court) filed by Joseph M. Fee. (Related document(s) #81 ) (Lamprey, Wayne) (Filed on 7/29/2011) Modified on 8/1/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 29, 2011 Filing 149 REPLY (re #81 MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court ) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David M. Zensky, #2 Proposed Order [Revised] Re Plaintiffs' Revised Motion to Stay, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/29/2011) Modified on 8/1/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/1/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 28, 2011 Filing 148 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Javad Rassouli served on 7/18/2011, answer due 8/8/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 28, 2011 Filing 147 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Nancy D. Ramage served on 7/14/2011, answer due 8/4/2011; Enzo S. Ricciardelli served on 7/14/2011, answer due 8/4/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 28, 2011 Filing 146 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Carpenters Pension Trust for Northern California served on 6/30/2011, answer due 7/21/2011; PG&E Postretirment Medical Plan TR served on 6/30/2011, answer due 7/21/2011; Will K. Weinstein served on 6/30/2011, answer due 7/21/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 28, 2011 Filing 145 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Virginia Lanfranki served on 6/26/2011, answer due 7/18/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 28, 2011 Filing 144 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Eric Morris served on 6/25/2011, answer due 7/18/2011; Nicholas H. Werthman served on 6/25/2011, answer due 7/18/2011. Shannon Morris served on 6/25/11, answer due 7/18/2011 (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 28, 2011 Filing 143 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. The Whittier Trust Company served on 6/14/2011, answer due 7/5/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE ON PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO THE ESTATE OF ROBERT D. NELSON'S OPPOSITION TO STAY MOTION TO JULY 29, 2011 re #139 Stipulation, filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/28/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 27, 2011 Filing 141 STIPULATION [Amended to Correct Pleading Caption] Stipulation to Extend Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan's Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Kaiser Foundation Health Plans and Hospital. (Anderson, David) (Filed on 7/27/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 27, 2011 Filing 140 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Kaiser Foundation Health Plans and Hospital. (Anderson, David) (Filed on 7/27/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 27, 2011 Filing 139 STIPULATION to Continue Deadline on Plaintiffs' Reply to The Estate of Robert D. Nelson's Opposition to Stay Motion to July 29, 2011 by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/27/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 26, 2011 Filing 138 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Paul Theodore Hammond as a Trustee of U/A/D 02/11/88 FBO Hammond Family Trust, to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/26/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 26, 2011 Filing 137 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Lucile Dunn to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/26/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 26, 2011 Filing 136 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Crowell Weedon & Co. to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/26/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 25, 2011 Filing 135 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Ynez Viole O'Neill. (Kim, Laura) (Filed on 7/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 25, 2011 Filing 134 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Betty Beaird. (Kim, Laura) (Filed on 7/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 22, 2011 Filing 133 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR HERBERT ANTHONY CLARK, JR TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT WITH PROOF OF SERVICE by Herbert Anthony Clark, Jr.. (Curtis, Greta) (Filed on 7/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 22, 2011 Filing 132 RESPONSE (re #81 MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court ) filed by PG&E Postretirment Medical Plan TR. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael A. Firestein in Support of Response, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Firestein Decl. (SLCFC Order), #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Firestein Decl. (July 15 Transcript))(Firestein, Michael) (Filed on 7/22/2011) Modified on 7/25/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #126 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey Bergman. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #125 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Mitchell Hurley. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #124 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Katherine P. Scully. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 22, 2011 Filing 128 RESPONSE (re #81 MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court ) filed by Carpenters Pension Trust for Northern California. (Kirchner, Donna) (Filed on 7/22/2011) Modified on 7/25/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 21, 2011 Filing 127 STIPULATION to Extend Time for PG&E Postretirement Medical Plan Trust to Respond to Complaint by PG&E Postretirment Medical Plan TR. (Firestein, Michael) (Filed on 7/21/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 21, 2011 Filing 123 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants Irving Rabin, Varda Rabin, and Rabin Worldwide, Inc. to Respond to Complaint by Irving Rabin, Varda Rabin, Rabin Worldwide, Inc.. (Lee, David) (Filed on 7/21/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 20, 2011 Filing 126 MOTION of Jeffrey H. Bergman for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007305.) filed by Melissa A Monson, Barbro Osher, Bernard Osher, Kevin Stone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 20, 2011 Filing 125 MOTION of Mitchell Hurley for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007303.) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 20, 2011 Filing 124 MOTION of Katherine P. Scully for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007303.) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 20, 2011 Filing 122 STIPULATION to Extend Time for James A. Friedberg and Thomas F. Friedberg to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 20, 2011 Filing 121 RESPONSE (re #81 MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court ) filed by Estate of Robert D. Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William C. Pultz, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Giacinti, Philip) (Filed on 7/20/2011) Modified on 7/20/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 20, 2011 Filing 120 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by George J. Peckham, Imogene S. Peckham. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 20, 2011 Filing 119 STIPULATION to Extend Time for George Peckham to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 19, 2011 Filing 118 STIPULATION to Extend Time for George William Buck, Individually and as Trustee of UTA Charles Schwab & Co. Inc. SEP-IRA DTD 4/8/93 to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/19/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 19, 2011 Filing 117 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Laurie H. Weaver.. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/19/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 19, 2011 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna Lynn Kirchner and George M. Kraw (Kirchner, Donna) (Filed on 7/19/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 18, 2011 Filing 115 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Melissa Monson, Kevin Stone, Bernard Osher, and Barbro Osher to Respond to Complaint by Melissa A Monson, Barbro Osher, Bernard Osher, Kevin Stone. (Lee, David) (Filed on 7/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 18, 2011 Filing 114 See document #115 for corrected entry.STIPULATION to Extend Time for Melissa Monson, Kevin Stone, Bernard Osher, and Barbro Osher to Respond to Complaint by Melissa A Monson. (Lee, David) (Filed on 7/18/2011) Modified on 7/19/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 18, 2011 Filing 113 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Imogene S. Peckham to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 15, 2011 Filing 112 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Steven D. Carver to Respond to the Complaint in this Action (Local Rule 6-1(A)) by Stephen D. Carver. (Zamora, Daniel) (Filed on 7/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 15, 2011 Filing 110 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Debra Gastler to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 15, 2011 Filing 109 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Catholic Healthcare West to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 14, 2011 Filing 108 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Omers Pension Fund re #106 Stipulation to Extend Time for Omers/AACP Investors II, L.P. (Sued Herein as "OMERS Pension Fund") (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 7/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 14, 2011 Filing 107 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melissa Ma re #105 Stipulation To Extend Time for Melisssa Ma to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 7/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 14, 2011 Filing 106 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR OMERS/AACP INVESTORS II, L.P. (SUED HEREIN AS "OMERS PENSION FUND") TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Omers Pension Fund. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 7/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 14, 2011 Filing 105 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR MELISSA MA TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Melissa Ma. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 7/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 14, 2011 Filing 104 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Florence S. Bradshaw to Respond to Complaint by Florence S. Bradshaw. (Poindexter, James) (Filed on 7/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 14, 2011 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Cahill Slaught (Slaught, Kathleen) (Filed on 7/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 14, 2011 Filing 102 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SA FUNDS INVESTMENT TRUST TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (L.R. 6-1(a)) by SA Funds Investment Trust. (Quiroz, Claudia) (Filed on 7/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 14, 2011 Filing 101 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Joseph M. Fee. (Lamprey, Wayne) (Filed on 7/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 14, 2011 Filing 100 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Virginia Lanfranki to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 13, 2011 Filing 111 ANSWER to Complaint byDespina Haigler, Richard Haigler. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 13, 2011 Filing 99 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Service waived by Jeffrey Chandler waiver sent on 6/29/2011, answer due 8/29/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 13, 2011 Filing 98 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Service waived by Judy C. Webb waiver sent on 6/29/2011, answer due 8/29/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 13, 2011 Filing 97 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Service waived by Susan Babcock waiver sent on 6/29/2011, answer due 8/29/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 13, 2011 Filing 96 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Service waived by Roger Goodan waiver sent on 6/29/2011, answer due 8/29/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 13, 2011 Filing 95 STIPULATION to Extend Time for S. Keating Rhoads and Carol Rhoads to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 13, 2011 Filing 94 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Carpenters Pension Trust Fund for Northern California to Respond to Complaint by Carpenters Pension Trust for Northern California. (Kirchner, Donna) (Filed on 7/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 13, 2011 Filing 92 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by State of California, Department of Personnel Administration, Savings Plus Plan. (Javid, Arman) (Filed on 7/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/13/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 12, 2011 Filing 93 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 11, 2011 Filing 90 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Sharron R. Beard to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 11, 2011 Filing 89 STIPULATION To Extend Time For Defendant William Kaszton To Repond To Complaint by William Kaszton. (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 7/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 11, 2011 Filing 88 STIPULATION To Extend Time For Defendant Patricia Kaszton To Respond To Complaint by Patricia Kaszton. (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 7/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 11, 2011 Filing 87 STIPULATION To Extend Time for Defendant Vern M. Strickler To Respond to Complaint by Vern M. Strickler. (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 7/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 11, 2011 Filing 86 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust.. (Libicki, Stuart) (Filed on 7/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 11, 2011 Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #81 MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 11, 2011 Filing 84 Duplicate of document #83 . Please Disregard.STIPULATION re #83 Stipulation VERDUSCO IS INCLUDED IN STIPULATION WITH JEFFREY J. APPLEBY by Catherine A. Verdusco. (Klein, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2011) Modified on 7/11/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 11, 2011 Filing 83 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR JEFFREY J. APPLEBY AND CATHERINE A. VERDUSCO TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Jeffrey J. Appleby Catherine A. Verdusco. (Klein, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2011) Modified on 7/11/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 11, 2011 Filing 82 STIPULATION to Extend Time For Monumental Life Insurance Company to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Monumental Life Insurance Company. (Graham, Douglas) (Filed on 7/11/2011) Modified on 7/11/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 8, 2011 Filing 81 MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, or (3) Further Order of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware or This Court; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 7/22/2011. Replies due by 7/29/2011. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Zensky, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order Re Plaintiffs' Revised Motion to Stay)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 8, 2011 Filing 80 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Stay (Docket No. 38) and Re-Filing of Revised Motion to Stay (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 8, 2011 Filing 79 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Nancy Lobdell to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 8, 2011 Filing 78 STIPULATION to Extend Time for William F. Thomas, Jr. to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 8, 2011 Filing 77 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Ronald C. Cey & Frances L. Cey, as Trustees of the Cey Living Trust, to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 8, 2011 Filing 76 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by zoological Society of San Diego, a California. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(DeLaCruz, Alfred) (Filed on 7/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 8, 2011 Filing 75 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 8, 2011 Filing 74 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Lawrence H Burks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hinds, James) (Filed on 7/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 8, 2011 Filing 73 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lawrence H Burks (Hinds, James) (Filed on 7/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 8, 2011 Filing 72 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lawrence H Burks. (Hinds, James) (Filed on 7/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 8, 2011 Filing 71 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand - Separate byLawrence H Burks. (Hinds, James) (Filed on 7/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 7, 2011 Filing 70 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Directors Guild of America Pension Trust to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Directors Guild of America Producer Pension Trust. (Meer, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 7, 2011 Filing 69 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Directors Guild of America to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/7/11. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 7, 2011 Filing 67 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Verna Harrah, individually and as Trustee of the Verna Harrah Trust Special Account DTD 9/5/86 to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 7, 2011 Filing 66 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Michael Plonski and Nedra Plonski to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Michael Plonski, Nedra Plonski, Wilmington Trust Company. (Cisz, Louis) (Filed on 7/7/2011) Modified on 7/8/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 7, 2011 Filing 65 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Company and Richard Arnold to Respond to Complaint by San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co.. (Poindexter, James) (Filed on 7/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 7, 2011 Filing 64 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESOND TO COMPLAINT by Richard Askin. (Kohlbrand, Richard) (Filed on 7/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 7, 2011 Filing 63 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Carol Askin. (Kohlbrand, Richard) (Filed on 7/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 6, 2011 Filing 62 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Warren Eide to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 6, 2011 Filing 61 STIPULATION to Extend Time for JOANNE DESHEROW SANGER, individually and as a Trustee of the U/A DTA 03/29/04 Joanne Desherow Sanger LIV TR to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 6, 2011 Filing 60 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Robert J. Brookes to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 6, 2011 Filing 59 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Durham Monsma and Robbie Monsma to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 6, 2011 Filing 58 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust. (Libicki, Stuart) (Filed on 7/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 6, 2011 Filing 57 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Southern California UFCWU & FE Joint Pension Trust Fund. (Libicki, Stuart) (Filed on 7/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 6, 2011 Filing 56 STIPULATION To Extend Time For First Republic Bank to Respond to Complaint by First Republic Bank. (Schneider, Walter) (Filed on 7/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 6, 2011 Filing 55 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by John E. Flick, Lois L. Flick. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Condren, Alan) (Filed on 7/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 6, 2011 Filing 54 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (Attachments: #1 Cert Serve) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 6, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. Initial CMC date of 9/9 before Judge Spero and 8/12 Motion hearing date. NOTE: Response and Replies to Motion to Stay are not terminated and are still in effect. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 5, 2011 Filing 53 Received Stipulation to Extend Time for Marlowe G. Merkel to Respond to Complaint by Marlowe G. Merkel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 5, 2011 Filing 52 STIPULATION to Extend for Mark A. Hughes and Danica F. Hughes to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 5, 2011 Filing 51 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Bank of the West to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 5, 2011 Filing 50 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom. (Clorfeine, Sabina) (Filed on 7/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 5, 2011 Filing 49 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Bernard Shapiro, individually and as a Trustee of FBO Bernard and Rena Shapiro Intervivos Trust A/C #1 DTD 10/15/87 and Rena Shapiro, individually and as a Trustee of FBO Bernard and Rena Shapiro Intervivos Trust A/C DTD 10/15/87 to Response to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 5, 2011 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Service waived by William Stinehart Jr.(individually and as a Trustee of Chandler Trust No. 1 and Chandler Trust No. 2) waiver sent on 6/24/2011, answer due 8/23/2011; William Stinehart Jr.(an individual) waiver sent on 6/24/2011, answer due 8/23/2011. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Authorized Agent to Accept Service of Summons & Complaint)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 5, 2011 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #46 Clerks Notice,, Re Consent to Jurisdiction of United States Magistrate Judge (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
July 5, 2011 Filing 46 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT TO JURISDICTION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE.. Accordingly, the parties are instructed to sign and file the enclosed consent or declination form within seven (7) calendar days of the date of this notice, indicating whether they consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge in this matter.If the parties do not consent, the case will be randomly assigned to a District Judge of this court. (Attachments: #1 Cert Serve) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER re #36 Stipulation To Extend Time for Rodolfo V. Gil to Respond to Complaint filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/30/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re #35 Stipulation To Extend Time for Quinn Martin Dolan to Respond to Complaint filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/30/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 30, 2011 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #38 MOTION to Stay Defendants Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, until the Earlier of (1) December 31, 2011, or (2) Modification by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware of Its Existi MOTION to Stay Defendants Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, until the Earlier of (1) December 31, 2011, or (2) Modification by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware of Its Existi MOTION to Stay Defendants Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, until the Earlier of (1) December 31, 2011, or (2) Modification by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware of Its Existi MOTION to Stay Defendants Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, until the Earlier of (1) December 31, 2011, or (2) Modification by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware of Its Existi (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 6/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re #34 Stipulation To Extend Time for Spencer W. Bear to Respond to Complaint filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/30/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DFTS MICHAEL W. DUNAWAY AND TRUDY DUNAWAY TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/30/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re #30 Stipulation To Extend Time filed by William J. Bell to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/29/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re #29 Stipulation To Extend Time filed by SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/29/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 29, 2011 Filing 38 MOTION to Stay Defendants Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, until the Earlier of (1) December 31, 2011, or (2) Modification by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware of Its Existing Order Regarding the Need to Stay This Action, or (3) Further Order of This Court; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 7/22/2011. Replies due by 7/29/2011. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David M. Zensky, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order Re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 6/29/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 29, 2011 Filing 37 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by William J. Bell.. (Reynolds, Jeremiah) (Filed on 6/29/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 29, 2011 Filing 36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR RODOLFO V. GIL TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 6/29/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 29, 2011 Filing 35 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR QUINN MARTIN DOLAN TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 6/29/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 29, 2011 Filing 34 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SPENCER W. BEARD TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 6/29/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 29, 2011 Filing 33 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Michael W. Dunaway, Trudy V. Dunaway. (Metzger, Scott) (Filed on 6/29/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 29, 2011 Filing 32 CLERKS NOTICE To Dft William Bell re: Consent or Declination. Form due 7/13/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 29, 2011 Filing 31 CLERKS NOTICE To Dft SDG&E re: Consent or Declination. Form due 7/13/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 28, 2011 Filing 30 STIPULATION To Extend Time For William J. Bell to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by William J. Bell. (Reynolds, Jeremiah) (Filed on 6/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 28, 2011 Filing 29 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SDG&E QUALIFIED NUCLEAR DECOM TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom. (Clorfeine, Sabina) (Filed on 6/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #25 Stipulation To Extend Time for Renee H. Miller To Respond to Complaint filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/28/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #24 Stipulation To Extend Time for Jonathan Gary Keith and Everything Medical Services, Inc., To Respond to Complaint, filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/28/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR IRIS B. MAHONEY AND PAUL M. MAHONEY TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/28/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 27, 2011 Filing 25 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR RENEE H. MILLER TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 6/27/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 27, 2011 Filing 24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR JONATHAN GARY KEITH AND EVERYTHING MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 6/27/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 27, 2011 Filing 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR IRIS B. MAHONEY AND PAUL M. MAHONEY TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 6/27/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 6/21/11, granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Angeline Koo.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 6/21/11, granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jason L. Goldsmith.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 6/21/11, granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for James P. Chou.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 6/21/11, granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Stephen M. Baldini.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 6/21/11, granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Daniel H. Golden.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 6/21/11,granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David Zensky. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 20, 2011 Filing 16 CLERKS NOTICE To Plaintiff re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Mag. Judge. Form due 7/5/11 (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 17, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Angeline Koo Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611061156) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 17, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Jason L. Goldsmith Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611061156) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 17, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission of Attorney James P. Chou Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611061156) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 17, 2011 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Stephen M. Baldini Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611061156) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 17, 2011 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission of attorney Daniel H. Golden Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611061156) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 17, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission of Attorney David Zenksky Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611061156) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #5 Ex Parte Application (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 2, 2011 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Betty Ann Altman, John M. Altman, Jeffrey J. Appleby, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, Archdiocese of Los Angeles Lay Employee Pension Plan, Richard S. Arnold, Carol Askin, Richard Askin, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Jacqueline E. Autry, Susan Babcock, Bank of The West, Donald Baron, Irene Baron, Betty Beaird, Sharron R. Beard, Spencer W. Beard, William J. Bell, Jill E. Berube, Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Jr University, Florence S. Bradshaw, Sherry Broder(individually and as a Trustee of Sherry P. Broder U/A DTD 1/1/94), Sherry P. Broder(an individual), Robert J. Brookes, Antoinette B. Brumbaugh, George William Buck, Lawrence H Burks, California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust, Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Carpenters Pension Trust for Northern California, Stephen D. Carver, Catholic Health West CHW, Catholic Healthcare West CHW, Frances L. Cey, Ronald C. Cey, Chandis Securities Company, Jeffrey Chandler, Eric I. Chang, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc, Charley Chunyu Lu & Biying Zhang Commercial Property, City National Bank, Herbert Anthony Clark, Jr., Tommie L. Cordero, Crowell Weedon & Co., Derek M. Dalton, Karen E. Dalton, Directors Guild of America, Directors Guild of America Producer Pension Trust, Doheney Eye Institute, Quinn Martin Dolan, Mark Domas, Francis G. Duggan, Jeanette M. Duggan, Michael W. Dunaway, Trudy V. Dunaway, Lucile M. Dunn, James H. Eckhouse, Jill E. Eckhouse, Warren J. Eide, Everything Medical, Inc., Joseph M. Fee, Bernadette Fingleton, First Republic Bank, John E. Flick, Lois L. Flick, James A. Friedberg, Thomas F. Friedberg, Camilla Chandler Frost, Debra A. Gastler, Rodolfo V. Gil, Roger Goodan, Helen Grossman, Despina Haigler, Richard Haigler, Karen Hammond, Paul Theodore Hammond, Verna R. Harrah, Herbert G. Lau Profit Sharing QRP Participation, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., E. Donald Heymann, Leonard F. Hill, Danica F. Hughes, Mark A. Hughes, Mark Allen Itkin, Nancy Fay Johnson, Omar F. Johnson Jr., Kaiser Foundation Health, Kaiser Foundation Health Plans and Hospital, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Patricia Kaszton, William Kaszton, Jonathan Gary Keith, Joe Youssry Kelada, John Lanfranki, Virginia Lanfranki, Chase L. Leavitt, Nancy Lobdell, Robert C. Lobdell, Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV, Charley Chunyu Lu, Melissa Ma, Nancy L. Mac Donald, William D. Mac Donald, Iris B. Mahoney, Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of the Iris B. Mahoney REV TR U/A/D 04/10/98), Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of U/W/O Paul P Mahoney DTD 12/28/1978), Irene M. McNulty, Mary Kathleen McNulty, Wayne F. McNulty, Alfred W. Merkel, Marlowe G. Merkel, Renee H. Miller, Durham J. Monsma, Robbie E. Monsma, Melissa A Monson, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Eric Morris, Robert D. Nelson, Ynez Viole O'Neill, Janice Fay Johnson Ochs, Omers Pension Fund, John A. Orb, John A. Orb Jr., Barbro Osher, Bernard Osher, PG&E Postretirment Medical Plan TR, Miriam A. Pawel, George J. Peckham, Imogene S. Peckham, Michael Plonski, Nedra Plonski, John Pritzker, Lisa Pritzker, Carl Zlatchin Profit, Qualified CPUC Decom Master TR, RWB, Irving Rabin, Varda Rabin, Rabin Worldwide, Inc., Nancy D. Ramage, Gelert R. Ramage, Jr., Robert Ramsey, Javad Rassouli, Remdel Brothers, Daniel H. Renberg, Carol Rhoads, S Keating Rhoads, Enzo S. Ricciardelli, Roman Catholic Archbishop LA, Claude Rosenberg, Louise Rosenberg, SC Edison Nuclear Facilities, SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom, Sacramento County Emp Ret System, Sacramento County Ret Association, San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co., Joanne Desherow Sanger, Mark I. Seiden, Susan H. Shane, Bernard Shapiro, Rena Shapiro, Southern California UFCWU & FE Joint Pension Trust Fund, Starbuck, Tisdale & Associates, State of California - Mid Cap Value, Randy Steiner(an individual), Douglas B. Stewart, John W. Stewart II, William Stinehart Jr.(individually and as a Trustee of Chandler Trust No. 1 and Chandler Trust No. 2), William Stinehart Jr.(an individual), Kevin Stone, Vern M. Strickler, T.Rowe Price, Lori Ann Talarico, Teamsters Separate Account, The Whittier Trust Company, William F. Thomas, Alfred V. Tjarks, Alfred V. Tjarks Jr., Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios, Union Bank of California N.A.,, Catherine A. Verdusco, Lolita K. Wagner, Water and Power Employee's Ret. Disab. & Death Benefit Ins. Plan, Laurie H. Weaver, Judy C. Webb, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Inc., Will K. Weinstein, Nicholas H. Werthman, Warren B. Williamson, Diane Buchanan Wilsey, Peter A. Young, Biying Zhang, Betty K Zlatchin, zoological Society of San Diego, a California. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 2, 2011 Filing 7 Proposed Order re #5 Ex Parte Application by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 2, 2011 Filing 6 Declaration of Julia I. De Beers in Support of #5 Ex Parte Application filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Related document(s) #5 ) (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 2, 2011 Filing 5 Ex Parte Application for an Order Granting Administrative Relief to File Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Complaint Under Seal filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 2, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011) Modified on 6/13/2011 (gba, COURT STAFF). (gba, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 2, 2011 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corporation, Corporate Parent Wilmington Trust Corporation for Wilmington Trust Company; Corporate Parent The Law Debenture Corporation plc for Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Corporate Parent Taunus Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011) (gba, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 2, 2011 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Case Management Conference, #3 Notice of Rule Discontinuing Service by Mail, #4 Standing Order for all Judges)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 2, 2011 Filing 1 Class Action COMPLAINT against Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Betty Ann Altman, John M. Altman, Jeffrey J. Appleby, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, Archdiocese of Los Angeles Lay Employee Pension Plan, Richard S. Arnold, Carol Askin, Richard Askin, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Jacqueline E. Autry, Susan Babcock, Bank of The West, Donald Baron, Irene Baron, Betty Beaird, Sharron R. Beard, Spencer W. Beard, William J. Bell, Jill E. Berube, Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Jr University, Florence S. Bradshaw, Sherry Broder(individually and as a Trustee of Sherry P. Broder U/A DTD 1/1/94), Sherry P. Broder(an individual), Robert J. Brookes, Antoinette B. Brumbaugh, George William Buck, Lawrence H Burks, California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust, Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Carpenters Pension Trust for Northern California, Stephen D. Carver, Catholic Health West CHW, Catholic Healthcare West CHW, Frances L. Cey, Ronald C. Cey, Chandis Securities Company, Jeffrey Chandler, Eric I. Chang, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc, Charley Chunyu Lu & Biying Zhang Commercial Property, City National Bank, Herbert Anthony Clark, Jr., Tommie L. Cordero, Crowell Weedon & Co., Derek M. Dalton, Karen E. Dalton, Directors Guild of America, Directors Guild of America Producer Pension Trust, Doheney Eye Institute, Quinn Martin Dolan, Mark Domas, Francis G. Duggan, Jeanette M. Duggan, Michael W. Dunaway, Trudy V. Dunaway, Lucile M. Dunn, James H. Eckhouse, Jill E. Eckhouse, Warren J. Eide, Everything Medical, Inc., Joseph M. Fee, Bernadette Fingleton, First Republic Bank, John E. Flick, Lois L. Flick, James A. Friedberg, Thomas F. Friedberg, Camilla Chandler Frost, Debra A. Gastler, Rodolfo V. Gil, Roger Goodan, Helen Grossman, Despina Haigler, Richard Haigler, Karen Hammond, Paul Theodore Hammond, Verna R. Harrah, Herbert G. Lau Profit Sharing QRP Participation, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., E. Donald Heymann, Leonard F. Hill, Danica F. Hughes, Mark A. Hughes, Mark Allen Itkin, Nancy Fay Johnson, Omar F. Johnson Jr., Kaiser Foundation Health, Kaiser Foundation Health Plans and Hospital, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Patricia Kaszton, William Kaszton, Jonathan Gary Keith, Joe Youssry Kelada, John Lanfranki, Virginia Lanfranki, Chase L. Leavitt, Nancy Lobdell, Robert C. Lobdell, Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV, Charley Chunyu Lu, Melissa Ma, Nancy L. Mac Donald, William D. Mac Donald, Iris B. Mahoney, Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of the Iris B. Mahoney REV TR U/A/D 04/10/98), Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of U/W/O Paul P Mahoney DTD 12/28/1978), Irene M. McNulty, Mary Kathleen McNulty, Wayne F. McNulty, Alfred W. Merkel, Marlowe G. Merkel, Renee H. Miller, Durham J. Monsma, Robbie E. Monsma, Melissa A Monson, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Eric Morris, Robert D. Nelson, Ynez Viole O'Neill, Janice Fay Johnson Ochs, Omers Pension Fund, John A. Orb, John A. Orb Jr., Barbro Osher, Bernard Osher, PG&E Postretirment Medical Plan TR, Miriam A. Pawel, George J. Peckham, Imogene S. Peckham, Michael Plonski, Nedra Plonski, John Pritzker, Lisa Pritzker, Carl Zlatchin Profit, Qualified CPUC Decom Master TR, RWB, Irving Rabin, Varda Rabin, Rabin Worldwide, Inc., Nancy D. Ramage, Gelert R. Ramage, Jr., Robert Ramsey, Javad Rassouli, Remdel Brothers, Daniel H. Renberg, Carol Rhoads, S Keating Rhoads, Enzo S. Ricciardelli, Roman Catholic Archbishop LA, Claude Rosenberg, Louise Rosenberg, SC Edison Nuclear Facilities, SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom, Sacramento County Emp Ret System, Sacramento County Ret Association, San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co., Joanne Desherow Sanger, Mark I. Seiden, Susan H. Shane, Bernard Shapiro, Rena Shapiro, Southern California UFCWU & FE Joint Pension Trust Fund, Starbuck, Tisdale & Associates, State of California - Mid Cap Value, Randy Steiner(an individual), Douglas B. Stewart, John W. Stewart II, William Stinehart Jr.(individually and as a Trustee of Chandler Trust No. 1 and Chandler Trust No. 2), William Stinehart Jr.(an individual), Kevin Stone, Vern M. Strickler, T.Rowe Price, Lori Ann Talarico, Teamsters Separate Account, The Whittier Trust Company, William F. Thomas, Alfred V. Tjarks, Alfred V. Tjarks Jr., Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios, Union Bank of California N.A.,, Catherine A. Verdusco, Lolita K. Wagner, Water and Power Employee's Ret. Disab. & Death Benefit Ins. Plan, Laurie H. Weaver, Judy C. Webb, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Inc., Will K. Weinstein, Nicholas H. Werthman, Warren B. Williamson, Diane Buchanan Wilsey, Peter A. Young, Biying Zhang, Betty K Zlatchin, zoological Society of San Diego, a California ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611060512.). Filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2011: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]
June 2, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas et al v. First Republic Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weintraub Capital Management, L.P.
Represented By: Jahan P. Raissi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florence S. Bradshaw
Represented By: James Wade Poindexter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension Plan, as administrator of the directors guild of America-Producer Pension Plan Basic Benefit Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Tree Capital Management LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Spurgeon Family Trust UAD
Represented By: Paige B. Tinkham
Represented By: David Charles Bohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zoological Society of San Diego, a California
Represented By: Alfred Michael DeLaCruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Stranahan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Olecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoinette B. Brumbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The J&M Trust UA Dated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine B. Flynn, as Trustee of Declaration of Bell Family Trust UA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Thomas decedents Trust U/S/T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Series Trust (F/K/A Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust)
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Represented By: Stuart Todd Steinberg
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Represented By: Scott Cameron Kessenick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Roeland Family Trust UA
Represented By: Mark Toshiro Hiraide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Carpenters Pension Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl V. Dichek
Represented By: Geoffrey Paul Knudsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilshire Mutual Funds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy R. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enzo S. Ricciardelli
Represented By: Michael Joseph Olecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lolita K. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Kaszton
Represented By: Marc Jeffrey Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGRO ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Eckhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trudy V. Dunaway
Represented By: Scott Louis Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Jr University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom
Represented By: Sabina Clorfeine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Youssry Kelada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric I. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Woods/Mitchell Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varda Rabin
Represented By: Shira Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn G. Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbro Osher
Represented By: Jeffrey Hoke Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Samuel S. Moore Trust U/A DTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanger Living Trust
Represented By: Marc Jeffrey Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Rhoads
Represented By: Marc Jeffrey Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Lobdell
Represented By: Mark A. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gelert R. Ramage, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlowe G. Merkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google |