Corley v. Vance et al
Plaintiff: Royce Corley
Defendant: Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., David Stuart, John Temples, Greg Weiss, Elizabeth Pederson, Dany Personnel, Brian Conroy, Michael Daly, Mark Woods, Jessica Sterling, Giancarlo Cavallo, Greg Smith, NYPD Personnel, Shari C. Hyman, Supervisor C.O. John Doe #1-2, OSE Personnel, Michael T Haggerty, Walter Panchyn, John Doe #3, Backpage.com, LLC, Sprint Nextel Corp., T-Mobile USA Inc., Facebook Inc., Google Inc, Time Warner Cable Inc., Research in Motion Ltd., Municipal Credit Union, Capital One N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. and and their unknown Custodian of Records #1-10
Case Number: 1:2015cv01800
Filed: March 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' November 6, 2020 letters (Dkt. #385-86) regarding their compliance with the Court's February 11, 2020 Order (Dkt. #358). Should Plaintiff wish to respond to Defendants' letters, any such r eply must be submitted on or before November 30, 2020. The Clerk of Court is directed to transmit a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at his address of record. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/9/2020) (rro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER granting 381 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The post-fact discovery conference is hereby ADJOURNED to October 22, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Moreover, the parties are ORDERED to provide the required joint status letter on or before October 15, 2020. If Defendants are completely unable to contact Plaintiff, they should submit a joint letter on that date without Plaintiff's input. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/7/2020) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (kv)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in this Order, Plaintiff's motion for default judgment is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/20/2020) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jca)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER granting 368 Letter Motion for Discovery. The Court is in receipt of the NYPD Defendants' letter regarding Officer Gregory Smith. The Court accepts Defendants' representation that the individual in question was not involved i n the NYPD's arrest or prosecution of Plaintiff, and that Defendants do not intend to rely on any information from the individual in this action. Therefore, the Court GRANTS Defendants' request that it be relieved from providing further information to Plaintiff about Officer Gregory Smith. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/11/2020) (mro)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER terminating 347 Motion to Compel. In sum, the Court ORDERS both sets of Defendants to, insofar as they rely on said objections, identify more practical methods by which Plaintiff may obtain the information he seeks and identify the means by which Plaintiff may obtain information believed to be publicly available to Plaintiff. The Court further ORDERS both sets of Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's proposed solution for his supernumerary interrogatories and to create and prov ide to Plaintiff a privilege log for materials claimed to fall within the attorney-client or work-product privileges. Separately, the Court ORDERS the NYPD Defendants to provide a log, insofar as it is practicable to do so, of any records relevant to Plaintiff's remaining claims that have since been destroyed by operation of law, including an identification of the record and the approximate date of destruction. Moreover, the Court ORDERS the NYPD Defendants, insofar as they rely on the Plan for Certain § 1983 Cases Against the City of New York as the sole reason for denying discovery of requested documents, to produce said requested documents. The Court additionally ORDERS the NYPD Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's request for identification of Officer Gregory Smith. All such orders contained herein shall be complied with no later than March 10, 2020. Finally, the post-fact discovery conference is hereby rescheduled for March 26, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. At the app ointed date and time for the conference, the Warden or other official in charge of the Federal Correctional Institution Petersburg Low in Petersburg, Virginia, shall produce inmate Royce Corley, Reg. No. 68011-054, at a suitable location within the Federal Correctional Institution Petersburg Low, equipped with a telephone, for the purpose of participating by telephone in the conference with the Court and defense counsel in the above referenced matter. At the appointed time, Defendants shall c all (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 6624801. Please note, the phone conference line will not be available prior to 4:00 p.m. Counsel for Defendants must (i) transmit this Order to the Warden forthwith; (ii) contact the Federal Correctional In stitution Petersburg Low forthwith to arrange the call and to determine the telephone number at which pro se plaintiff will be reachable at the above time and date; and (iii) telephone the Court with pro se plaintiff on the line at the time and date of the conference. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 347. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/11/2020) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rro)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER denying 342 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court finds that Plaintiff has failed to point to controlling decisions or data that the Court overlooked, or that might reasonably be expected to alter the Court's conclusions. Instead, Plain tiff has largely repeated his prior arguments. Therefore, the Court finds that Plaintiff has failed to meet his burden on a motion for reconsideration. Plaintiff's motion is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket number 342. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/16/2019) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rro)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 336 OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated in this Opinion, Blackberry's motion to dismiss and Sprint's motion for summary judgment are GRANTED. Plaintiff's cross-motions as to both Defendants are DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at docket entries 283, 304, and 317. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/15/2019) (cf)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 OPINION AND ORDER re: 211 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Refiled per Court Notice filed by Municipal Credit Union, 179 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Woods, Giancarlo Cavallo, Greg Smith, Michael Daly, Brian Conroy, Jes sica Sterling, Shari C. Hyman, 169 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion filed by T-Mobile USA Inc., 166 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Dismiss 15 CV 1800. filed by Greg Weiss, Elizabeth Pederson, John Temples, David Stuar t, Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., Dany Personnel, 216 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss filed by Time Warner Cable Inc., 185 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Facebook Inc., 174 MOTION to Dismiss the complaint filed by Capital One N.A., 267 MOTION for Sanctions. MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. filed by Royce Corley, 183 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC., Walter Panchyn, Michael T Haggerty, 171 MOT ION to Dismiss Complaint as to Chase Only Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., 189 MOTION for Joinder DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S LIMITED JOINDER IN MOTION TO DISMISS AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF DEFEN DANT FACEBOOK, INC. filed by Google Inc,. With regard to Case No. 15 Civ. 9621, Defendants motions to dismiss are GRANTED, and Plaintiff's 9621 Complaint is dismissed in its entirety. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pen ding motions, adjourn all remaining dates, and close that case. With regard to Case No. 15 Civ. 1800, the motions to dismiss submitted by the following parties are GRANTED in their entirety: T-Mobile, Facebook, Google, TWC, MCU, Capital One, Chase , Con Edison, and the City of New York. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate these parties. The DA Defendant's motion is DENIED as to Plaintiff's claims for unlawful search and seizure, and GRANTED in all other respects. The NYPD Defendant's motion is DENIED as to Plaintiff's claims for malicious prosecution, and unlawful search and seizure, and GRANTED in all other respects. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at Docket Entries 166, 169, 17 1, 174, 179, 183, 185, 189, 211, 216, and 267 in Case No. 15 Civ. 1800. The remaining parties are directed to submit a proposed Case Management Plan for the Court's consideration on or before May 1, 2019. The parties should be mindful that di scovery in this case will only be permitted as it pertains to Plaintiffs' three remaining claims; discovery may not be taken as to any claim dismissed in this Opinion. SO ORDERED. (City of New York, Facebook Inc., Google Inc,, JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., Municipal Credit Union, T-Mobile USA Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC. and Capital One N.A. terminated.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/27/2019) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (anc)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 16 Motion for Reconsideration; terminating 10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at Docket Entries 10 (wh ich has been addressed by prior order) and 16. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/10/2015) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corley v. Vance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royce Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyrus R. Vance, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Temples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dany Personnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giancarlo Cavallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Personnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shari C. Hyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervisor C.O. John Doe #1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSE Personnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Panchyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Backpage.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research in Motion Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: and their unknown Custodian of Records #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?