Burgess v. Superintendent of Otisville Correctional Facility et al
Plaintiff: |
Kelvit Burgess |
Defendant: |
Superintendent of Otisville Correctional Facility, P. Early, S. Roberts, A. Smith_Roberts, D. Glebocki, L. Hurd, Herbert E. Goulding, Superintendent of Green Correctional Facility, Hammon, Cole and Smith |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv09256 |
Filed: |
November 23, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
White Plains Office |
County: |
Greene |
Presiding Judge: |
Vincent L. Briccetti |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 13, 2017 |
Filing
79
OPINION AND ORDER re: 71 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. filed by Cole, Smith, M. Hammond, Brandon Smith. The Greene Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED as to plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim rega rding unsafe showers against Deputy Superintendent Hammond; plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim regarding inadequate medical care against Nurse Cole; plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claims regarding the orthopedist referral and improper docu mentation of his medical conditions against Dr. Smith; and plaintiff's ADA discrimination claim regarding busing at Greene against all the Greene Defendants. The Greene Defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED as to plaintiff's unsafe showers claim against Superintendent Smith, Nurse Cole, and Dr. Smith; and as to the inadequate medical care claim against Dr. Smith for refusing to provide plaintiff his knee and back braces. The Greene Defendants' motion to sever and tra nsfer is DENIED. By July 26, 2017, the Greene Defendants shall file an answer to the amended complaint. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the motion. (Doc. #71). The Clerk is further instructed to mail a copy of this order to plaintiff. Plaintiff and counsel for defendants shall attend the previously-scheduled case management conference on September 6, 2017, at 10:30 a.m., at the United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, Courtroom 620, White Plains, New York, at which time the Court will consider all case management matters and issue a revised Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and theref ore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED., (Cole answer due 7/26/2017; M. Hammond answer due 7/26/2017; Smith answer due 7/26/2017; Brandon Smith answer due 7/26/2017.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/12/17) (yv)
|
November 21, 2016 |
Filing
59
AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER: The motion to dismiss is DENIED as to plaintiff's ADA discrimination claim related to busing at Otisville. The motion to dismiss is GRANTED as to the Eighth Amendment conditions of confinement claim against the Gr eene Defendants; the ADA retaliation claim; and the ADA discrimination claim related to busing at Greene. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to amend with respect to (i) the Eighth Amendment conditions of confinement claim regarding allegedly unsafe showe rs at Greene, and (ii) the ADA discrimination claims regarding busing, both of which are brought against the Greene Defendants. Plaintiff's amended complaint shall be filed by no later than December 30, 2016, in accordance with Part IV above. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk is instructed to terminate the motion. (Doc. #32). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 11/21/2016) (lnl)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?