In re: Treasury Securities Auction Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Beaver County Employees' Retirement Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Robert L. Teel, Lackawanna County Employees' Retirement Fund, M & N Trading, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, Boston Retirement System, Rutgers Enhanced Insurance Company, CNB Bancorp, Inc., The New Jersey Laborers Statewide Funds, United International Insurance Company, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Pension Fund, City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Breakwater Trading LLC, Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Endeavor Trading, LLC, Jane Franklin, State-Boston Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund, Michael St. John, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Thomas E. Kalaway, City of Providence, Michael J. Smith, Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, The Police Retirement System of St Louis, Jonathan Richard Williamson, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Marc Federighi, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Erie County Employees' Retirement System and BWT Professional Trading, LLC
Defendant: TD Securities (USA) LLC, Jeffries LLC, Barclays Bank, PLC, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Bank of Nova Scotia, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Morgan Stanley, Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing L.P., J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, Countrywide Securities Corp., Citigroup Global Market Inc., Credit Suisse International, Bank of America, N.A., Commerz Markets LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, SG Americas Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., RBS Securities Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC, UBS AG, BMO Capital Markets Corp., UBS Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch Government Securities Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., CitiGroup, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Nomura Securities International Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse Group AG, 3RED TRADING LLC, Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Mizuho Securities USA Inc. and Dealerweb Inc
Consolidated Plaintiff: American Federation of Teachers, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, Rogers Varner, Jr., Laborers Local 231 Pension Fund, Richard Corbett, Laborers Local 100 and 397 Health and Welfare Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Pension Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Torus Capital LLC, Marina Fouts, Brian Fisher, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Air Conditioning and Refrigeration Industry Retirement Trust and Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, University of Puerto Rico Retirement System, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC and Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland
Consolidated Defendant: Bank of America Corp. and John Doe Defendants Nos. 1-100
Case Number: 1:2015md02673
Filed: December 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 1.4 granting #392 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for Anthony Van Vuren to withdraw as counsel for the Platform Defendants is granted, and Mr. Van Vuren's appearance is withdrawn as of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to remove Mr. Van Vuren from the CM/ECF service list for this action. Attorney Anthony R. Van Vuren terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/16/2021) (nb)
June 15, 2021 Filing 393 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert White Cobbs on behalf of Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Cobbs, Robert)
June 15, 2021 Filing 392 MOTION for Anthony R. Van Vuren to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Dealerweb Inc, Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al..(Roellke, Jon)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 1.4 granting #386 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for Nicholas J. Boyle to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated is granted, and Mr. Boyle's appearance is withdrawn as of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to remove Mr. Boyle from the CM/ECF service list for this action. Attorney Nicholas James Boyle terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/14/2021) (nb)
June 11, 2021 Filing 390 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Olga Kogan on behalf of RBS Securities Inc...(Kogan, Olga)
June 11, 2021 Filing 389 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Gabor Mehes on behalf of RBS Securities Inc...(Mehes, Adam)
June 10, 2021 Filing 388 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by UBS AG..(Kirsch, Mark)
June 10, 2021 Filing 387 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Sloan Carter on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co...(Carter, Jonathan)
June 10, 2021 Filing 386 MOTION for Nicholas J. Boyle to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al..(Smallwood, Jesse)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER granting #383 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/10/21) (yv)
June 8, 2021 Filing 384 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #382 Response to Motion, filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs seek to file under seal portions of the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (the "Complaint"). The Complaint is a "judicial document" within the meaning of Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110 (2d Cir. 2006), and thus a presumption of public access applies to it. Plaintiffs' submission does not provide a basis for sealing under Lugosch. Accordingly, the application is denied without prejudice to a re-submission that satisfies the Lugosch standard. To the extent that the Complaint references material provided by non-parties, Plaintiffs are directed to inform the non-parties forthwith that the Court intends to provide public access to the Complaint, and that any application from the non-parties to seal must be submitted by June 15, 2021. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/8/2021) (cf)
June 8, 2021 Filing 383 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Richard A. Rosen, David G. Januszewski, and Robert Y. Sperling dated June 8, 2021. Document filed by Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC..(Januszewski, David)
June 8, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 6/15/2021. (cf)
June 7, 2021 Filing 382 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory S. Asciolla dated June 7, 2021 re: #379 LETTER MOTION to Seal Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Michael Eisenkraft dated May 14, 2021. . Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System..(Asciolla, Gregory)
May 14, 2021 Filing 381 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #226 Amended Complaint,,,,,, against BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corp., Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank, PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Market Inc., Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Dealerweb Inc, Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing L.P., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merrill Lynch Government Securities Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC, UBS AG, UBS Securities LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Rock Capital Markets, LLC, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, Torus Capital LLC, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Boston Retirement System, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. Related document: #226 Amended Complaint,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Redlined Comparison to ECF 227-1).(Eisenkraft, Michael)
May 14, 2021 Filing 380 ***EX-PARTE*** AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #226 Amended Complaint,,,,,, against BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corp., Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank, PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Market Inc., Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Dealerweb Inc, Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing L.P., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merrill Lynch Government Securities Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC, UBS AG, UBS Securities LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Pension Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Rock Capital Markets, LLC, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, Torus Capital LLC, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Boston Retirement System, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. Related document: #226 Amended Complaint,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Redlined Comparison to ECF 227-1)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #379 .(Eisenkraft, Michael)
May 14, 2021 Filing 379 LETTER MOTION to Seal Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Michael Eisenkraft dated May 14, 2021. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Pension Fund..(Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 30, 2021 Filing 378 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays US LLC, Corporate Parent Barclays US Holdings Ltd., Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC for Barclays Capital Inc.. Document filed by Barclays Capital Inc...(Schwartz, Matthew)
April 28, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Matthew Alexander Schwartz to RE-FILE Document #377 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (ldi)
April 22, 2021 Filing 377 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent BARCLAYS BANK PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays US LLC, Corporate Parent Barclays US Holdings Ltd. for Barclays Capital Inc.. Document filed by Barclays Capital Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al..(Schwartz, Matthew) Modified on 4/28/2021 (ldi).
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER granting #375 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend #375 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend the Consolidated Class Action Complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Daniel L. Brockett, Michael B. Eisenkraft, and Gregory Asciolla dated April 9, 2021. Plaintiffs will submit their amended Complaint by May 14, 2021. The briefing schedule for Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss is as follows: Defendants' motion is due June 14, 2021; Plaintiffs' opposition is due July 14, 2021; Defendants' reply, if any, is due July 28, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/14/2021) Amended Pleadings due by 5/14/2021. (ks)
April 14, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 6/14/2021. Responses due by 7/14/2021 Replies due by 7/28/2021. (ks)
April 9, 2021 Filing 375 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend the Consolidated Class Action Complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Daniel L. Brockett, Michael B. Eisenkraft, and Gregory Asciolla dated April 9, 2021. Document filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH..(Brockett, Daniel)
March 31, 2021 Filing 374 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for J.P Morgan Securities LLC, J.P Morgan Securities LLC, J.P Morgan Securities LLC, J.P Morgan Securities LLC, J.P Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JP. Morgan Securities, LLC.. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P Morgan Securities LLC, JP. Morgan Securities, LLC., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al..(Liu, Henry)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 373 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: #270 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss (Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the Auction Conspiracy Claims). filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co., #277 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on Joint Motion to Dismiss the Auction Conspiracy Claims (ECF No. 270), and Joint Motion to Dismiss the Boycott Conspiracy Claims (ECF No. 274), addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Liaison Counsel for filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co., #289 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on the Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Daniel Brockett and Interim Co-Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs dated May 22, 2018. filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, American Federation of Teachers, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Boston Retirement System, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, M & N Trading, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Torus Capital LLC, Brian Fisher, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund, #274 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Boycott Claims. filed by J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., #278 MOTION to Dismiss all claims. filed by Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC, Dealerweb Inc. Accordingly, Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend. Any motion for leave to amend will be submitted by April 30, 2021. The proposed amended pleading will be attached to the motion as an exhibit, with a redline comparison. For the reasons stated above, Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted in its entirety. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions. (Dkt. Nos. 270, 274, 277, 278, 285, 289). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/31/2021) (jca)
March 31, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2021. (jca)
January 19, 2021 Filing 372 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nathaniel A. Tarnor on behalf of City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05794-PGG, 1:15-cv-06003-PGG, 1:15-cv-06072-PGG.(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (368) MOTION for Jason A. Zweig to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney Jason Allen Zweig terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/19/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05794-PGG, 1:15-cv-06003-PGG, 1:15-cv-06072-PGG (jca)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (369) MOTION for Jeffrey D. Friedman to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney Jeff D. Friedman terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/19/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05794-PGG, 1:15-cv-06003-PGG, 1:15-cv-06072-PGG (jca)
January 14, 2021 Filing 369 MOTION for Jeffrey D. Friedman to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05794-PGG, 1:15-cv-06003-PGG, 1:15-cv-06072-PGG.(Zweig, Jason)
January 14, 2021 Filing 368 MOTION for Jason A. Zweig to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05794-PGG, 1:15-cv-06003-PGG, 1:15-cv-06072-PGG.(Zweig, Jason)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (366) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. It is hereby ordered that the appearance of Paul M. Eckles on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc. be withdrawn. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/8/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (jca)
December 8, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #367 Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jca)
December 7, 2020 Filing 366 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Paul M. Eckles to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Citigroup Global Market Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen Hoffman Lent, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al..(Lent, Karen) Modified on 12/8/2020 (db).
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 365 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (362) MOTION for Kavitha S. Sivashanker to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kavitha Satya Sivashanker terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/21/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (jca)
September 21, 2020 Filing 364 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #363 Letter filed by J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. Attorney Claire Catalano Dean terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/21/2020) (cf)
September 18, 2020 Filing 363 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Claire Catalano Dean dated September 18, 2020 re: Withdrawal as Attorney. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Dean, Claire)
September 18, 2020 Filing 362 MOTION for Kavitha S. Sivashanker to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc...(Sivashanker, Kavitha)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #360 Notice (Other) filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co.. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney Maya Krugman terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/11/2020) (kv)
September 9, 2020 Filing 360 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Maya Krugman as Counsel for Defendant Goldman, Sachs & Co. LLC. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co...(Krugman, Maya)
August 21, 2020 Filing 359 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David George Januszewski on behalf of Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. New Address: Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP, 32 Old Slip, New York, New York, United States 10005, 2127013000..(Januszewski, David)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 358 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: granting #357 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Christopher R. Barker terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/29/2020) (ama)
June 24, 2020 Filing 357 MOTION for Christopher R. Barker to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Brockett, Daniel)
April 16, 2020 Filing 356 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Danuiel L Brockett dated April 16, 2020 re: Response to Defendant' letters regarding Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, American Federation of Teachers, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Brian Fisher, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Brockett, Daniel)
April 14, 2020 Filing 355 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jon R. Roellke dated April 14, 2020 re: Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Dealerweb Inc, Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC..(Van Vuren, Anthony)
April 13, 2020 Filing 354 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Staci Lynn Yablon on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs & Co, Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Goldman, Sachs & Co, Goldman, Sachs & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al..(Yablon, Staci)
April 9, 2020 Filing 353 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Liaison Counsel for Defendants dated April 9, 2020 re: Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Sonterra Opinion, #2 Exhibit B-SSA Opinion, #3 Exhibit C-ICE LIBOR Opinion, #4 Exhibit D-Platinum Opinion).(Rosen, Richard)
March 13, 2020 Filing 352 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Hoffman Lent on behalf of Citigroup Global Market Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al..(Lent, Karen)
March 13, 2020 Filing 351 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jay B. Kasner on behalf of Citigroup Global Market Inc.. New Address: Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP, One Manhattan West, New York, New York, 10001-8602,. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al..(Kasner, Jay)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (348) MOTION for Caroline Stanton to Withdraw as Attorney as Counsel. The motion for withdrawal of Caroline Stanton as counsel to Defendant HSBC Securities (USA) Inc. and for her removal from this actions ECF service list, is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Attorney Caroline W. Stanton terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/21/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05794-PGG (jca)
February 12, 2020 Filing 349 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. Related Document Number: [348 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG and 230 in 1:15-cv-05794-PGG]..(Bamberger, Nowell)
February 12, 2020 Filing 348 MOTION for Caroline Stanton to Withdraw as Attorney as Counsel. Document filed by HSBC Securities (USA) Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05794-PGG.(Bamberger, Nowell)
December 5, 2019 Filing 347 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) BMO Capital Markets Corp., Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC, 3RED TRADING LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corp., Bank of America, N.A., Bank of Nova Scotia, Barclays Bank, PLC, CIBC World Markets Corp., CitiGroup, Inc., Citigroup Global Market Inc., Commerz Markets LLC, Countrywide Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Dealerweb Inc, Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing L.P., J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jeffries LLC, John Doe Defendants Nos. 1-100, Merrill Lynch Government Securities Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International Inc., SG Americas Securities LLC, Michael St. John, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC, UBS AG, UBS Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp, Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Goldman Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, UBS Securities LLC. Document filed by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Laborers Local 231 Pension Fund, Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05939-PGG, 1:15-cv-07631-PGG, 1:15-cv-09169-PGG(Caldes, William)
December 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney William Caldes. RE-FILE Document No. (114 in 1:15-cv-07631-PGG) Notice (Other), (69 in 1:15-cv-09169-PGG) Notice (Other), (346 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) Notice (Other), (226 in 1:15-cv-05939-PGG) Notice (Other). The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the voluntary dismissal;. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. When re-filing the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal file it in the 15-md-2673 and spread it to the other three cases :15-cv-05939-PGG, 1:15-cv-07631-PGG, 1:15-cv-09169-PGG Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05939-PGG, 1:15-cv-07631-PGG, 1:15-cv-09169-PGG(dt)
December 4, 2019 Filing 346 B> FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Document filed by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Laborers Local 231 Pension Fund. (Caldes, William) Modified on 12/5/2019 (dt).
November 6, 2019 Filing 345 RESPONSE re: #344 Letter / Supplemental Authority Submission. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, American Federation of Teachers, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Brian Fisher, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Brockett, Daniel)
October 28, 2019 Filing 344 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jon R. Roellke dated October 28, 2019 re: Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Dealerweb Inc, Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC.(Van Vuren, Anthony)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER. Plaintiffs Inter-Local Pension Fund Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, and Twin City Iron Workers Pension Fund's motion for an order directing the withdrawal of Anna M. Horning Nygren as their counsel, and for Anna M. Horning Nygren to be removed from this action's ECF service list, is GRANTED. So ordered. Re case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (222) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anna Marie Horning Nygren terminated in case 1:15-cv-05939-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/21/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05794-PGG, 1:15-cv-05939-PGG, 1:15-cv-09803-PGG. (rjm)
October 14, 2019 Filing 342 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Daniel L. Brockett, J. Douglas Richards, and Jay L. Himes dated October 14, 2019 re: in Response to Defendants October 4, 2019 Letter (Dkt. 341). Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, American Federation of Teachers, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Brian Fisher, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund.(Brockett, Daniel)
October 4, 2019 Filing 341 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Adam S. Hakki dated October 4, 2019 re: Supplemental Authority. Document filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corp., Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank, PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Market Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing L.P., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC.(Hakki, Adam)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 NOTICE AND ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that, upon the annexed declaration of Susanna Michele Buergel, and subject to the approval of the Court, Adam Block Schwartz hereby withdraws as counsel for Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC and shall be removed from the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) notification list in the above-captioned matter. Mr. Schwartz is no longer associated with Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP. Susanna Michele Buergel, Kenneth Anthony Gallo, Brad Scott Karp, and Richard A. Rosen of Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP will continue to represent Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC in this proceeding. SO ORDERED. Attorney Adam Block Schwartz terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/12/2019) (jca)
July 9, 2019 Filing 339 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. Related Document Number: [Dkt No. 152 - Notice of Appearance by Adam Block Schwartz]. (Buergel, Susanna)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 338 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (334) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney Hugh Daniel Sandler terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/7/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (jca)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (335) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Plaintiffs Inter-Local Pension Fund Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, and Twin City Iron Workers Pension Fund's motion for an order directing the withdrawal of Anna M. Homing Nygren as their counsel, and for Anna M. Homing Nygren to be removed from this action's ECF service list, is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Attorney Anna Marie Horning Nygren terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/7/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05794-PGG, 1:15-cv-05939-PGG, 1:15-cv-09803-PGG (jca)
May 7, 2019 Filing 336 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Whitney Erin Street on behalf of Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System. New Address: Block & Leviton LLP, 100 Pine Street, Suite 1250, San Francisco, CA, United States 94111, 415-968-8999. (Street, Whitney)
May 3, 2019 Filing 335 MOTION for Anna M. Horning Nygren to Withdraw as Attorney as Counsel for Plaintiffs. Document filed by Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horning Nygren, Anna)
April 19, 2019 Filing 334 FIRST MOTION for Hugh D. Sandler to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by BWT Professional Trading, LLC, Breakwater Trading LLC, Endeavor Trading, LLC, Marc Federighi, Michael St. John. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Hugh)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (330 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Melissa Carrie King terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/4/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(jca)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 332 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (329) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Elizabeth P. Papez terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/4/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (jca)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 331 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (328) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney Thomas Popejoy terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/4/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (jca)
April 2, 2019 Filing 330 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Melissa King dated April 2, 2019 re: To Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Document filed by RBS Securities Inc..(King, Melissa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 329 MOTION for Elizabeth P. Papez to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torpey, Susannah)
March 14, 2019 Filing 328 MOTION for Thomas Popejoy to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Torus Capital LLC, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Popejoy, Thomas)
February 7, 2019 Filing 327 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jeffrey L. Spector on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Spector Roseman & Kodroff P.C., 2001 Market Street, Suite 3420, Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, United States 19103, 2154960300. (Spector, Jeffrey)
February 7, 2019 Filing 326 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by William G. Caldes on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Spector Roseman & Kodroff P.C., 2001 Market Street, Suite 3420, Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, United States 19103, 2154960300. (Caldes, William)
February 7, 2019 Filing 325 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert Mark Roseman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Spector Roseman & Kodroff P.C., 2001 Market Street, Suite 3420, Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, United States 19103, 2154960300. (Roseman, Robert)
February 7, 2019 Filing 324 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Eugene A. Spector on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Spector Roseman & Kodroff P.C., 2001 Market Street, Suite 3420, Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, United States 19103, 2154960300. (Spector, Eugene)
January 11, 2019 Filing 323 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brian Byrne on behalf of HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. New Address: Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP, 2112 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, United States 20037, (202) 974-1500. (Byrne, Brian)
January 9, 2019 Filing 322 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Caroline W. Stanton on behalf of HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. New Address: Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP, 2112 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, United States 20037, (202) 974-1500. (Stanton, Caroline)
January 9, 2019 Filing 321 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Nowell D. Bamberger on behalf of HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. New Address: Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP, 2112 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, United States 20037, (202) 974-1500. (Bamberger, Nowell)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER in case 1:15-cv-07111-PGG; granting (319) Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Attorney Dana Statsky Smith in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. WHEREAS on January 7, 2019, Plaintiff moved the Court pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 for leave to withdraw the appearance of Dana Statsky Smith, and WHEREAS Plaintiff has shown satisfactory reasons for her withdrawal, it is hereby ORDERED that Dana Statsky Smith be removed from the docket in this matter. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate Ms. Statsky Smith from the docket and to close Dkt. 124. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/8/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-07111-PGG (jca)
January 7, 2019 Filing 319 MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Attorney Dana Statsky Smith. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-07111-PGG(Bernstein, Stanley)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 1.4: Upon the motion by Defendant Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated and the accompanying declaration of Lauren K. Collogan, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for Lauren K. Collogan to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated is granted, and Ms. Collogan's appearance is withdrawn as of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to remove Ms. Collogan from the CM/ECF service list for this action. Attorney Lauren Kristina Collogan terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/28/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05794-PGG(mro)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting #316 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. In a motion dated October 30, 2018, Lauren K. Kollogan moved to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. (Dkt. No. 220) An affidavit in support of Ms. Collogan's motion states that as of November 2, 2018, Ms. Collagan will no longer be associated with the law firm of Williams & Connolly LLP, which is representing Defendant Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., and that other attorneys at Williams & Connolly LLP continue to be counsel of record for this Defendant. (Id.) It is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4, the motion is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion. (Dkt. No. 220). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/2/2018) (cf)
October 30, 2018 Filing 316 MOTION for Lauren Kristina Collogan to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05794-PGG(Collogan, Lauren)
October 17, 2018 Filing 315 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert D. Wick dated October 17, 2018 re: Boycott Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' letter of October 11, 2018. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Wick, Robert)
October 11, 2018 Filing 314 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Daniel L. Brockett, J. Douglas Richards, and Jay L. Himes dated October 11, 2018 re: Iowa Public Employees' Retirement System v. Merrill Lynch. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, American Federation of Teachers, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Brian Fisher, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund.(Eisenkraft, Michael)
September 18, 2018 Filing 313 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Steve W. Berman on behalf of City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund. New Address: Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP, 1301 Second Avenue, Suite 2000, Seattle, WA, USA 98101, 206-623-7292. (Berman, Steve)
August 30, 2018 Filing 312 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Merrill G Davidoff on behalf of United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. New Address: Berger Montague PC, 1818 Market Street, Suite 3600, Philadelphia, PA, United States 19103, 215-875-3000. (Davidoff, Merrill)
August 30, 2018 Filing 311 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David Francis Sorensen on behalf of United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. New Address: Berger Montague PC, 1818 Market Street, Suite 3600, Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA 19103, 215-875-3000. (Sorensen, David)
August 30, 2018 Filing 310 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Eric L. Cramer on behalf of United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. New Address: Berger Montague PC, 1818 Market Street, Suite 3600, Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA 19103, 215-875-3000. (Cramer, Eric)
August 30, 2018 Filing 309 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Patrick Fanning Madden on behalf of United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. New Address: Berger Montague PC, 1818 Market Street, Suite 3600, Philadelphia, PA, United States 19103, 215-875-3000. (Madden, Patrick)
August 23, 2018 Filing 308 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Richard Rosen dated August 23, 2018 re: N.Y.R.P.C. 1.12. Document filed by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC.(Rosen, Richard)
August 1, 2018 Filing 307 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maude Paquin on behalf of RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Inc.,, RBS Securities, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Paquin, Maude)
August 1, 2018 Filing 306 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Steel Mishkin on behalf of RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Inc.,, RBS Securities, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Mishkin, Paul)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL #304 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for David A. Young to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiffs Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, and MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH is granted, and Mr. Young's appearance is withdrawn as of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to remove Mr. Young from the CM/ECF service list for this action. (As further set forth in this Order.) Attorney David A. Young terminated (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/30/2018) (cf)
July 25, 2018 Filing 304 MOTION for David A. Young to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, David)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:15-cv-05931-PGG; granting (302) Motion for Eric L. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/15/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05931-PGG (tn)
July 12, 2018 Filing 302 MOTION for Eric L. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15314847. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric L. Young, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jayne)
July 12, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #302 MOTION for Eric L. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15314847. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER granting (214) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (168) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (298) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. Attorney Michael Walter Stocker terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG; 15-cv-05794-PGG; 15-cv-05830. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/2/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05794-PGG, 1:15-cv-05830-PGG (cf)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (169 in 1:15-cv-07420-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (210 in 1:15-cv-06129-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (173 in 1:15-cv-05931-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (137 in 1:15-cv-07329-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (215 in 1:15-cv-05794-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (139 in 1:15-cv-07642-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (106 in 1:15-cv-07631-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (177 in 1:15-cv-07385-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (128 in 1:15-cv-07735-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (201 in 1:15-cv-06474-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (102 in 1:16-cv-01177-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (215 in 1:15-cv-05939-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (147 in 1:15-cv-09803-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (148 in 1:15-cv-06003-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (145 in 1:15-cv-06892-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (95 in 1:15-cv-07855-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (245 in 1:15-cv-05807-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc.,, (138 in 1:15-cv-06853-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (163 in 1:15-cv-06782-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (127 in 1:15-cv-08149-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (218 in 1:15-cv-05957-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (162 in 1:15-cv-07688-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (180 in 1:15-cv-07006-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (171 in 1:15-cv-08766-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (179 in 1:15-cv-07390-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (98 in 1:16-cv-00180-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (169 in 1:15-cv-05830-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (299 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (147 in 1:15-cv-06072-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (120 in 1:15-cv-07111-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (89 in 1:15-cv-08484-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Joel M. Cohen terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/2/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(cf)
June 29, 2018 Filing 299 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Joel M. Cohen dated June 29, 2018 re: To Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Document filed by RBS Securities Inc..(Cohen, Joel)
June 25, 2018 Filing 298 MOTION for Michael W. Stocker to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, State-Boston Retirement System.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05794-PGG, 1:15-cv-05830-PGG(Asciolla, Gregory)
June 4, 2018 Filing 297 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Michael B. Eisenkraft dated June 4, 2018 re: Harry v. Total Gas. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, American Federation of Teachers, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Brian Fisher, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund.(Eisenkraft, Michael)
June 4, 2018 Filing 296 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Michael B. Eisenkraft dated June 4, 2018 re: Response to ECF Nos. 292 and 295. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, American Federation of Teachers, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Brian Fisher, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund.(Eisenkraft, Michael)
June 4, 2018 Filing 295 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jon R. Roellke dated June 4, 2018 re: Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Dealerweb Inc, Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC.(Roellke, Jon)
June 1, 2018 Filing 294 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Peter George Safirstein on behalf of Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH. New Address: Safirstein Metcalf LLP, The Empire State Building, 350 Fifth Ave., 59th Floor, New York, NY, 10118, (212) 201-2845. (Safirstein, Peter)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 293 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (291) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Stephanie Szaro Heglund terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/30/2018) ***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (anc) Modified on 8/13/2018 (anc).
May 30, 2018 Filing 292 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Liaison Counsel for Defendants dated May 30, 2018 re: Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Januszewski, David)
May 30, 2018 Filing 291 MOTION for Stephanie S. Heglund to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Barclays Bank, PLC, Barclays Capital Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephanie S. Heglund, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Heglund, Stephanie)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #286 Motion for David Jarrett Arp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/24/2018) (cf)
May 23, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #286 MOTION for David Jarrett Arp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15103253. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
May 22, 2018 Filing 289 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on the Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Daniel Brockett and Interim Co-Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs dated May 22, 2018. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, American Federation of Teachers, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Brian Fisher, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund.(Brockett, Daniel)
May 22, 2018 Filing 288 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #278 MOTION to Dismiss all claims. . Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, American Federation of Teachers, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Brian Fisher, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Brockett, Daniel)
May 22, 2018 Filing 287 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #274 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Boycott Claims. Class Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Boycott Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the Boycott Claims. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, American Federation of Teachers, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Brian Fisher, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Brockett, Daniel)
May 22, 2018 Filing 286 MOTION for David Jarrett Arp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15103253. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Arp, David)
May 22, 2018 Filing 285 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Stacey Anne Mahoney dated May 22, 2018 re: request for oral argument on Tradeweb's motion to dismiss. Document filed by Dealerweb Inc, Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC.(Mahoney, Stacey)
May 22, 2018 Filing 284 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #278 MOTION to Dismiss all claims. . Document filed by Dealerweb Inc, Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC. (Roellke, Jon)
May 22, 2018 Filing 283 DECLARATION of Stacey Anne Mahoney in Support re: #278 MOTION to Dismiss all claims.. Document filed by Dealerweb Inc, Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Roellke, Jon)
May 22, 2018 Filing 282 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #278 MOTION to Dismiss all claims. . Document filed by Dealerweb Inc, Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC. (Roellke, Jon)
May 22, 2018 Filing 281 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Popejoy on behalf of American Federation of Teachers, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Torus Capital LLC, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. (Popejoy, Thomas)
May 22, 2018 Filing 280 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #270 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss (Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the Auction Conspiracy Claims). Class Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Auction Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the Auction Claims. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, American Federation of Teachers, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Brian Fisher, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Brockett, Daniel)
May 22, 2018 Filing 279 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #282 Memorandum) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #278 MOTION to Dismiss all claims. . Document filed by Dealerweb Inc, Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Roellke, Jon) Modified on 5/24/2018 (db).
May 22, 2018 Filing 278 MOTION to Dismiss all claims. Document filed by Dealerweb Inc, Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC.(Roellke, Jon)
May 22, 2018 Filing 277 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on Joint Motion to Dismiss the Auction Conspiracy Claims (ECF No. 270), and Joint Motion to Dismiss the Boycott Conspiracy Claims (ECF No. 274), addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Liaison Counsel for Defendants dated May 22, 2018. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Papez, Elizabeth)
May 22, 2018 Filing 276 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #274 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Boycott Claims. . Document filed by J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Wick, Robert)
May 22, 2018 Filing 275 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #274 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Boycott Claims. . Document filed by J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Wick, Robert)
May 22, 2018 Filing 274 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Boycott Claims. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Wick, Robert)
May 22, 2018 Filing 273 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #270 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss (Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the Auction Conspiracy Claims). . Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Papez, Elizabeth)
May 22, 2018 Filing 272 DECLARATION of Eric Bickford in Support re: #270 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss (Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the Auction Conspiracy Claims).. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Curriculum Vitae)(Papez, Elizabeth)
May 22, 2018 Filing 271 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #270 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss (Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the Auction Conspiracy Claims). . Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Papez, Elizabeth)
May 22, 2018 Filing 270 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss (Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the Auction Conspiracy Claims). Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Papez, Elizabeth)
May 22, 2018 Filing 269 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Lepri on behalf of American Federation of Teachers, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Torus Capital LLC, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. (Lepri, Thomas)
May 22, 2018 Filing 268 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Michael Abensohn on behalf of American Federation of Teachers, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Torus Capital LLC, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. (Abensohn, Adam)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #266 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/17/2018) (ras)
May 14, 2018 Filing 266 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages // on behalf of liason counsel for all defendants addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David G. Januszewski dated May 14, 2018. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC.(Januszewski, David)
May 10, 2018 Filing 265 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard C. Pepperman, II on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Pepperman, Richard)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 264 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT UBS AG: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), Plaintiffs hereby voluntarily dismiss all claims against UBS AG without prejudice to reassert such claims against UBS AG at a later time should evidence arise in discovery or otherwise that reveals information providing a basis for joining UBS AG on the claims being litigated in this case, and the Parties agree that any statute of limitations, statute of repose, or other time-related defense or claim shall be tolled as to UBS AG only such that any claim will be deemed to have been filed on November 16, 2017, as further set forth in this Order. UBS AG terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/18/2018) (cf)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL granting #258 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. This matter having come before the Court by the filing of a Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for defendant Cantor Fitzgerald & Co. by Michael S. Popok, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED and ADJUDGED as follows that Michael S. Popok is hereby permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for Cantor Fitzgerald & Co. in the above-captioned action. SO ORDERED. Attorney Michael Steven Popok terminated (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/13/2018) (ama)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL granting #260 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED and ADJUDGED as follows that David A. Paul is hereby permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for Cantor Fitzgerald & Co. in the above-captioned action. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/13/2018) (cf) Modified on 6/5/2018 (cf).
April 11, 2018 Filing 261 DECLARATION of David A. Paul in Support re: #260 MOTION for David A. Paul to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (Paul, David)
April 11, 2018 Filing 260 MOTION for David A. Paul to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Paul, David)
April 11, 2018 Filing 259 DECLARATION of Michael S. Popok in Support re: #258 MOTION for Michael S. Popok to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (Popok, Michael)
April 11, 2018 Filing 258 MOTION for Michael S. Popok to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Popok, Michael)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER: granting #256 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/11/2018) (ap)
April 9, 2018 Filing 256 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Daniel L. Brockett, J. Douglas Richards and Jay L. Himes dated April 9, 2019. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, American Federation of Teachers, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Brian Fisher, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund.(Brockett, Daniel)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 255 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT CREDIT SUISSE INTERNATIONAL: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), Plaintiffs hereby voluntarily dismiss all claims against Defendant CSI without prejudice to reassert such claims against CSI at a later time should evidence arise in discovery or otherwise that reveals information providing a basis for joining CSI on the claims being litigated in this case, as further set forth in this Order. Credit Suisse International terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/23/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(cf) Modified on 5/16/2018 (cf).
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney Jordan Ari Goldstein terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/4/2018) (ap) Modified on 3/5/2018 (ap).
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney Faith E. Gay terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/4/2018) (ap)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE: ENDORSEMENT: IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney Christine H. Chung terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/26/2018) (ap)
February 23, 2018 Filing 251 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claire Catalano Dean on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P Morgan Securities LLC, JP. Morgan Securities, LLC., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Dean, Claire)
February 23, 2018 Filing 250 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Agnes Dunogue on behalf of BNP Paribas Securities Corp.. (Dunogue, Agnes)
February 23, 2018 Filing 249 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John F. Cove, Jr on behalf of BNP Paribas Securities Corp.. (Cove, John)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS CITIGROUP INC.; CREDIT SUISSE GROUP AG; THE GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC.; JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.; MORGAN STANLEY; AND THE ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND GROUP PLC: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), Plaintiffs hereby voluntarily dismiss all claims against Defendants Citigroup Inc.; Credit Suisse Group AG; The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.; JP Morgan Chase & Co.; Morgan Stanley; and The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc without prejudice to reassert such claims against such Defendants at a later time should evidence arise in discovery (as further set forth in this Order.) JP Morgan Chase & Co., Morgan Stanley, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, CitiGroup, Inc. and Credit Suisse Group AG terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/23/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(cf)
February 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #246 Motion for Carol A. Szurkowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/19/2018) (mro)
February 15, 2018 Filing 246 MOTION for Carol A. Szurkowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14704390. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Carol A. Szurkowski)(Szurkowski, Carol)
February 15, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #246 MOTION for Carol A. Szurkowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14704390. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JON R. ROELLKE granting #244 Motion for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/12/2018) (cf)
February 8, 2018 Filing 244 MOTION for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14676235. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dealerweb Inc, Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit of Jon R. Roellke in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Proposed Order)(Roellke, Jon)
February 8, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #244 MOTION for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14676235. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: granting (242) MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 1.4. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Attorney David J. Woll terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/2/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (ap) Modified on 3/28/2018 (ap).
January 31, 2018 Filing 242 MOTION for David J. Woll to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Woll, David)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ANTHONY R. VAN VUREN: granting (240) Motion for Anthony R. Van Vuren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/31/2018). (Motion filed in 15-md-2673 # 240) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (ama)
January 31, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #240 MOTION for Anthony R. Van Vuren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14640866. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 30, 2018 Filing 240 MOTION for Anthony R. Van Vuren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14640866. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dealerweb Inc, Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit of Anthony R. Van Vuren in Support of Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Proposed Order)(Van Vuren, Anthony)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER: granting #236 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/29/2018) (ap)
January 25, 2018 Filing 238 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tara Halsch Curtin on behalf of Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Curtin, Tara)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. Defendants' deadline to move against or answer the complaint will be extended from January 23, 2018 to February 23, 2018. 2. Plaintiffs' deadline to file their Opposition to any Motion(s) to Dismiss the complaint will be extended from March 9, 2018 to April 17, 2018. 3. Defendants' deadline to reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to any Motion(s) to Dismiss the complaint will be extended from April 17, 2018 to May 22, 2018. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Motions due by 2/23/2018., Responses due by 4/17/2018, Replies due by 5/22/2018.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/17/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(cf)
January 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer Deadline for All Defendants (cf)
January 16, 2018 Filing 236 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Richard A. Rosen, David G. Januszewski and Elizabeth P. Papez dated 01/16/2018. Document filed by Credit Suisse Group AG, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC.(Rosen, Richard)
January 9, 2018 Filing 235 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Thomson Reuters Corporation for Dealerweb Inc, Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC. Document filed by Dealerweb Inc, Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC.(Mahoney, Stacey)
January 9, 2018 Filing 234 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stacey Anne Mahoney on behalf of Dealerweb Inc, Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC. (Mahoney, Stacey)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL granting #230 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: This matter having come before the Court by the filing of a Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for defendant Jefferies LLC by Jon R. Roellke, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED and ADJUDGED as follows that Jon R. Roellke is hereby permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for Jefferies LLC in the above-captioned action. (Attorney Jon Randall Roellke terminated) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/8/2018) (jwh)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting #231 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED and ADJUDGED as follows that Anthony R. Van Vuren is hereby permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for Jefferies LLC in the above-captioned action. Attorney Anthony R. Van Vuren terminated (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/8/2018) (cf)
January 4, 2018 Filing 231 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Anthony R. Van Vuren to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Jeffries LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anthony R. Van Vuren, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Vuren, Anthony) Modified on 3/2/2018 (ldi).
January 4, 2018 Filing 230 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jon R. Roellke to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Jeffries LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jon R. Roellke, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roellke, Jon) Modified on 3/2/2018 (ldi).
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #228 Motion for Alison Deich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/3/2018) (ap)
January 2, 2018 Filing 228 MOTION for Alison Deich to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Torus Capital LLC, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Deich, Alison)
January 2, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #228 MOTION for Alison Deich to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 29, 2017 Filing 227 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Faith E. Gay, Douglas Richards and Jay L. Himes dated December 29, 2017 re: Corrected Consolidated Class Complaint. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, American Federation of Teachers, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Brian Fisher, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Redline Corrected)(Gay, Faith)
December 29, 2017 Filing 226 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #204 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, against BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Market Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Dealerweb Inc, Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC, UBS Securities LLC, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank, PLC, CitiGroup, Inc., Credit Suisse Group AG, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing L.P., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., Morgan Stanley, UBS AG, Credit Suisse International, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, M & N Trading, Brian Fisher, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Rock Capital Markets, LLC, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, Torus Capital LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, American Federation of Teachers, Boston Retirement System. Related document: #204 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,.(Gay, Faith)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (219) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney Joseph M Vanek and Joseph Michael Vanek terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/26/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:16-cv-00005-PGG (cf)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on : (218) granting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney David P. Germaine terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/26/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:16-cv-00005-PGG (ama)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (220) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney Alberto Rodriguez terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/26/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:16-cv-00005-PGG (cf)
December 15, 2017 Filing 222 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Alison Deich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14482015. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Torus Capital LLC, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Deich, Alison) Modified on 12/15/2017 (wb).
December 15, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #222 MOTION for Alison Deich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14482015. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AGAINST CERTAIN DEFENDANTS: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that the above-captioned action, In re: Treasury Securities Auction Antitrust Litigation, No. 15-md-2673 (PGG), is, as to only the following Defendants not named in Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint dated November 16, 2017-Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency; BMO Capital Markets Corp.; Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.; CIBC World Markets Corp.; Commerz Markets LLC; Countrywide Securities Corp.; Daiwa Capital Markets America, Inc.; Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.; HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.; Jefferies LLC; Mizuho Securities USA Inc.; Nomura Securities International, Inc.; RBC Capital Markets, LLC; SG Americas Securities LLC; and TD Securities (USA) LLC--dismissed without prejudice and without costs to any party as against any other party. (As further set forth in this Order.) Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Commerz Markets LLC, Countrywide Securities Corp., Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Jeffries LLC, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Nomura Securities International Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SG Americas Securities LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency and CIBC World Markets Corp. terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/11/2017) (cf)
December 11, 2017 Filing 220 MOTION for Alberto Rodriguez to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Michael J. Smith.(Rodriguez, Alberto)
December 7, 2017 Filing 219 MOTION for Joseph M. Vanek to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Michael J. Smith.(Vanek, Joseph)
December 7, 2017 Filing 218 MOTION for David P. Germaine to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Michael J. Smith.(Germaine, David)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (124 in 1:15-cv-07325-PGG, 85 in 1:15-cv-10118-PGG, 213 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 89 in 1:15-cv-10116-PGG) Letter, filed by 3RED TRADING LLC. SO ORDERED. (3RED TRADING LLC terminated.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/28/2017)**Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed Only In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-07325-PGG, 1:15-cv-10116-PGG, 1:15-cv-10118-PGG(anc)
November 29, 2017 Filing 216 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc.. (pc)
November 29, 2017 Filing 215 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tradeweb Markets LLC. (pc)
November 29, 2017 Filing 214 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dealerweb Inc. (pc)
November 29, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents 3RED TRADING LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of Nova Scotia, Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Market Inc., Commerz Markets LLC, Countrywide Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Dealerweb Inc, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, Jeffries LLC, Merrill Lynch Government Securities Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities LLC, Michael St. John, TD Securities (USA) LLC, Tradeweb Markets LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc. added. Party added pursuant to #204 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,.Document filed by Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, M & N Trading, Brian Fisher, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Rock Capital Markets, LLC, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, Torus Capital LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, American Federation of Teachers, Boston Retirement System, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. Related document: #204 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,.(Futter, Toby)
November 21, 2017 Filing 213 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Sandra D. Hauser dated 11/21/2017 re: Requesting that the Court direct the Clerk of the Court to amend the docket for this MDL to reflect that 3Red has been terminated from this action as a Defendant. Document filed by 3RED TRADING LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-07325-PGG, 1:15-cv-10116-PGG, 1:15-cv-10118-PGG(Hauser, Sandra)
November 20, 2017 Filing 212 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan Ari Goldstein on behalf of American Federation of Teachers, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Torus Capital LLC, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. (Goldstein, Jordan)
November 20, 2017 Filing 211 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine H. Chung on behalf of American Federation of Teachers, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Torus Capital LLC, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. (Chung, Christine)
November 17, 2017 Filing 210 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tradeweb Markets LLC, re: #204 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, American Federation of Teachers, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Brian Fisher, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Gay, Faith)
November 17, 2017 Filing 209 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dealerweb Inc., re: #204 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, American Federation of Teachers, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Brian Fisher, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Gay, Faith)
November 17, 2017 Filing 208 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., re: #204 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, American Federation of Teachers, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Brian Fisher, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Gay, Faith)
November 16, 2017 Filing 207 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tradeweb Market, LLC, re: #204 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, American Federation of Teachers, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Brian Fisher, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Gay, Faith) Modified on 11/17/2017 (pc).
November 16, 2017 Filing 206 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Traderweb IDB Markerts, Inc., re: #204 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, American Federation of Teachers, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Brian Fisher, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Gay, Faith) Modified on 11/17/2017 (pc).
November 16, 2017 Filing 205 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dealerweb Inc., re: #204 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, American Federation of Teachers, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Brian Fisher, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Gay, Faith) Modified on 11/17/2017 (pc).
November 16, 2017 Filing 204 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #18 Amended Complaint,,, against 3RED TRADING LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of Nova Scotia, Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Market Inc., Commerz Markets LLC, Countrywide Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, Jeffries LLC, Merrill Lynch Government Securities Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities LLC, Michael St. John, TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Tradeweb Markets LLC, Dealerweb Inc with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Brian Fisher, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Rock Capital Markets, LLC, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Torus Capital LLC, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, American Federation of Teachers, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, Boston Retirement System, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, M & N Trading, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund. Related document: #18 Amended Complaint,,,.(Gay, Faith)
October 30, 2017 Filing 203 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maya Krugman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Krugman, Maya)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (195) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Patrick Joseph Campbell terminated in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/3/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05794-PGG (cf)
September 29, 2017 Filing 201 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kavitha Satya Sivashanker on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutche Bank Securities Inc., Deustche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Sivashanker, Kavitha)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 STIPULATION SETTING TIME FOR FILING CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT, AND BRIEFING ON MOTION TO DISMISS: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. Plaintiffs' deadline to file their complaint will be extended from September 22, 2017 to November 15, 2017. 2. Defendants' deadline to move against or answer the complaint will be extended from October 23, 2017 to January 23, 2018. 3. Plaintiffs' deadline to file their Opposition to any Motion to Dismiss the complaint will be March 9, 2018. 4. Defendants' deadline to reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to any Motion(s) to Dismiss the complaint will be April 17, 2018. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Amended Pleadings due by 11/15/2017., Motions due by 1/23/2018., Responses due by 3/9/2018, Replies due by 4/17/2018.), Motions terminated: #199 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time In Further Support of Proposed Scheduling Stipulation filed on September 1, 2017 (Dkt. 189) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Faith E. Gay, Jay L. Himes, J.Douglas Richards, dated September 15, 2017. filed by American Federation of Teachers, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, State-Boston Retirement System, #189 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re: Proposed Scheduling Stipulation addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Faith E. Gay, Jay L. Himes, J. Douglas Richards, Robert Y. Sperling, Brad S. Karp and David J. Woll dated September 1, 2017. filed by American Federation of Teachers, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, State-Boston Retirement System. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/18/2017) (cf)
September 15, 2017 Filing 199 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time In Further Support of Proposed Scheduling Stipulation filed on September 1, 2017 (Dkt. 189) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Faith E. Gay, Jay L. Himes, J.Douglas Richards, dated September 15, 2017. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, State-Boston Retirement System, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Gay, Faith)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER: On August 31, 2017, the Quinn-Cohen-Labaton group recommended a three firm steering committee comprised of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP, Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP, and Berger & Montague, P.C. (the "Robbins-Hagens-Berger group"). (Dkt. No. 188) No oppositions were filed. This Court therefore appoints the Robbins-Hagens-Berger group as plaintiffs' steering committee. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/13/2017) (cf)
September 12, 2017 Filing 197 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Elizabeth M. Zito on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC. New Address: Goodwin Procter LLP, The New York Times Building, 620 Eighth Avenue, New York City, New York, 10018, 212-813-8800. (Zito, Elizabeth)
September 12, 2017 Filing 196 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gabrielle Lisa Gould on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Gould, Gabrielle)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, plaintiff H. Rogers Varner Jr. voluntarily dismisses its action captioned H. Rogers Varner, Jr. On Behalf of Himself and All Others Similarly Situated v. Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, et al., No. 1:15-cv-07325-UA without prejudice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/6/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-07325-PGG(cf)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, plaintiffs City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System and Thomas E. Kalaway voluntarily dismiss their action captioned City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, et al. v. Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, et al., No. 1:15-cv-10116-PGG without prejudice. (As further set forth in this Order.) Plaintiffs' dismissal is without prejudice to their rights to recover as class members in the MDL action. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/6/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-10116-PGG(cf)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, plaintiff Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund of Chicago voluntarily dismisses its action captioned Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund of Chicago v. Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, et al., No. 1:15-cv-10118-PGG without prejudice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/6/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-10118-PGG(cf)
September 6, 2017 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Michael Guzman for noncompliance with Section 18.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document #190 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #191 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #192 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal to: judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. (km)
September 5, 2017 Filing 192 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) BMO Capital Markets Corp, BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P Morgan Securities LLC, Jefferies L.L.C., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International Inc, RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC, 3RED TRADING LLC. Document filed by Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-10118-PGG(Burke, Christopher) Modified on 9/6/2017 (km).
September 5, 2017 Filing 191 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Market Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, Jeffries LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC, 3RED TRADING LLC. Document filed by City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, Thomas E. Kalaway. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-10116-PGG(Burke, Christopher) Modified on 9/6/2017 (km).
September 5, 2017 Filing 190 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, Without prejudice against the defendant(s) 3RED TRADING LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corp., Bank of Nova Scotia, Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Market Inc., Commerz Markets LLC, Countrywide Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, Jeffries LLC, John Doe Defendants Nos. 1-100, Merrill Lynch Government Securities Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities LLC, Michael St. John, TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Daiwa Capital Markets America Holdings Inc., Deutche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities USA Inc., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets, L.L.C., SG Americas Securities, L.L.C., TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Rogers Varner, Jr. Document filed by Rogers Varner, Jr. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-07325-PGG(Guzman, Michael) Modified on 9/6/2017 (km).
September 1, 2017 Filing 189 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re: Proposed Scheduling Stipulation addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Faith E. Gay, Jay L. Himes, J. Douglas Richards, Robert Y. Sperling, Brad S. Karp and David J. Woll dated September 1, 2017. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, State-Boston Retirement System, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation regarding deadlines for Consolidated Complaint and Motion to Dismiss Briefing)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Gay, Faith)
August 31, 2017 Filing 188 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Faith E. Gay, J. Douglas Richards and Jay L. Himes dated August 29, 2017 re: Proposal for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in response to the Court's August 23, 2017 Order. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, State-Boston Retirement System, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH.(Gay, Faith)
August 31, 2017 Filing 187 NOTICE of Corporate Name Change to Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Sperling, Robert)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER terminating (135) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:15-cv-07688-PGG; denying (78) Motion to Appoint ; denying (85) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting (86) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting (88) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (91) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (94) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting (98) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (100) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (113) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. For the reasons set forth above, the motions of the Quinn-Cohen-Labaton group (Dkt. Nos. 86, 88, 98) for appointment as interim co-lead counsel are granted. Motions by other movants (Dkt. Nos. 78, 81, 85, 91-92, 94, 100, 103, 113) are denied. Lead counsel will make a recommendation to the Court as to the membership and size of the plaintiffs' steering committee by August 31, 2017. Any party objecting to lead counsel's recommendation will file its objection by September 7, 2017. The Consolidated Amended Complaint will be filed by September 22, 2017. Any motion to dismiss will be filed by October 23, 2017. Winston & Strawn LLP, Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Gariison LLP, and Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP will serve as liaison counsel for Defendants. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motions (Dkt. Nos. 78, 85-86, 88, 91, 94, 98, 100, 113 and 135 in 15-cv-7688). (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/23/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-07688-PGG (cf)
August 23, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/22/2017. Motions due by 10/23/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-07688-PGG(cf)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (124) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew Michael Purdy terminated in case 1:15-cv-06853-PGG; granting (184) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Andrew Michael Purdy terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/17/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-06853-PGG (cf)
August 11, 2017 Filing 184 MOTION for Andrew M. Purdy to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Pension Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-06853-PGG(Saveri, Joseph)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #182 Letter, filed by RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Greg Donald Andres terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/29/2017) (cf)
July 28, 2017 Filing 182 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory D. Andres dated July 28, 2017 re: Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Document filed by RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Inc.,, RBS Securities Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Andres, Greg)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (121) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew S. Weiler terminated in case 1:15-cv-06853-PGG; granting (180) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Matthew S. Weiler terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/8/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-06853-PGG (cf)
July 7, 2017 Filing 180 MOTION for Matthew S. Weiler to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Pension Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-06853-PGG(Saveri, Joseph)
June 12, 2017 Filing 179 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Esinam Mawuena Daisy Agbemenu on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutche Bank Securities Inc., Deustche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Agbemenu, Esinam)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #176 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Patrick Joseph Campbell terminated (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/17/2017) (cf)
May 15, 2017 Filing 177 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Myers on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Myers, Jonathan)
May 15, 2017 Filing 176 MOTION for Patrick Joseph Campbell to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Campbell, Patrick)
May 3, 2017 Filing 175 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Faith E. Gay, J. Douglas Richards & Jay L. Himes dated May 3, 2017 re: Recent Disclosures regarding US Treasuries Market. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, State-Boston Retirement System, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Gay, Faith)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (173 in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Joel Steven Sanders terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/7/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (cla) Modified on 4/17/2017 (cla).
April 6, 2017 Filing 173 MOTION for Joel S. Sanders to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by UBS Securities LLC.(Sanders, Joel)
April 4, 2017 Filing 172 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from J. Douglas Richards, Jay L. Himes and Faith E. Gay dated April 4, 2017 re: Response to Mr. Zelcs' letter of April 3, 2017. Document filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH.(Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting (109) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 1:15-cv-07329-PGG; granting (97) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. Daniel J. Veroff is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs and fully discharged from any further representation or obligation in this case. 2. Pillsbury & Coleman, LLP will continue to represent Plaintiffs in this action. 3. Daniel J. Veroff (email: dveroff@p1llsburycoleman.com) is removed from the mailing matrix and from receiving electronic filings in this case. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/4/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-07329-PGG (cf)
April 3, 2017 Filing 170 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from George A. Zelcs dated April 3, 2017 re: Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Authority in Support of Appointment of Korein Tillery, Scott+Scott, Hausfeld, and Kaplan Fox as Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Document filed by City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Thomas E. Kalaway, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago, Rogers Varner, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Zelcs, George)
March 23, 2017 Filing 169 NOTICE of withdrawal. Document filed by RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Zito, Elizabeth)
March 23, 2017 Filing 168 NOTICE of Withdrawal. Document filed by RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Rohnke, Sophie-Charlotte)
January 26, 2017 Filing 167 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David E. Kovel dated January 26, 2017 re: Notice of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Richard Corbett, Brian Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-07735-PGG(Kovel, David)
January 26, 2017 Filing 166 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from J. Douglas Richards, Jay L. Himes and Faith E. Gay dated January 26, 2017 re: Response to Mr. Zelcs' letter of January 23, 2017. Document filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Eisenkraft, Michael)
January 24, 2017 Filing 165 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Marshall Howard Fishman on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC. New Address: Goodwin Procter LLP, The New York Times Building, 620 Eighth Avenue, New York, NY, USA 10018, (212) 813-8800. (Fishman, Marshall)
January 23, 2017 Filing 164 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from George A. Zelcs dated January 23, 2017 re: Plaintiffs' Supplemental Authority in Support of Appointment of Korein Tillery, Scott+Scott, Hausfeld, and Kaplan Fox as Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Document filed by City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Thomas E. Kalaway, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago, Rogers Varner, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zelcs, George)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #162 Notice (Other) filed by City of Providence, United International Insurance Company, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Rutgers Enhanced Insurance Company. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Jayne Goldstein and Jayne Arnold Goldstein terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/11/2017) (cf)
January 10, 2017 Filing 162 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., City of Providence, Rutgers Enhanced Insurance Company, United International Insurance Company. (Goldstein, Jayne)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL granting #160 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (As further set forth in this Order.) Attorney John Joseph Hughes, III terminated (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/4/2017) (cf)
January 3, 2017 Filing 160 MOTION for John J. Hughes, III to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of John J. Hughes, III)(Hughes, John)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #156 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Ronald J. Aranoff) filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/3/2017) (mro)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #157 Motion for Lauren Wagner Pederson to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/3/2017) (mro)
December 28, 2016 Filing 157 MOTION for Lauren Wagner Pederson to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Richard Corbett and Brian Fisher. Document filed by Richard Corbett, Brian Fisher.(Elrod, Thomas)
December 27, 2016 Filing 156 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Aranoff, Ronald)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #149 Motion for Richard A. Koffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/14/2016) (cf)
November 22, 2016 Filing 154 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) AS TO PLAINTIFF AIR CONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY RETIREMENT TRUST: Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Air Conditioning and Refrigeration Industry Retirement Trust hereby gives notice that its claims against all Defendants in the above-captioned action are voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice. Such dismissal applies only to Plaintiff Air Conditioning and Refrigeration Industry Retirement Trust, whose case was originally docketed as Case No. 15-cv-08287, and does not apply to any other Plaintiff in the above-captioned MDL, Case No. 15-md-02673. Air Conditioning and Refrigeration Industry Retirement Trust (on behalf of itself, and, in a representative capacity, on behalf of all those similarly situated) and Air Conditioning and Refrigeration Industry Retirement Trust (on behalf of itself, and, in a representative capacity, on behalf of all those similarly situated) terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/22/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-08287-PGG(cf)
November 21, 2016 Filing 153 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) ONLY as to Plaintiff Air Conditioning And Refrigeration Industry Retirement Trust. Document filed by Air Conditioning and Refrigeration Industry Retirement Trust. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-08287-PGG(Eisler, Robert)
November 1, 2016 Filing 152 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Block Schwartz on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Schwartz, Adam)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #58 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Alexis Lien terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/12/2016) (kl)
September 27, 2016 Filing 150 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert G. Eisler dated September 27, 2016 re: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to Plaintiff Air Conditioning and Refrigeration Industry Retirement Trust. Document filed by Air Conditioning and Refrigeration Industry Retirement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-08287-PGG(Eisler, Robert)
September 26, 2016 Filing 149 MOTION for Richard A. Koffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12799465. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, Torus Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koffman, Richard)
September 26, 2016 Filing 148 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from George A. Zelcs dated September 26, 2016 re: Courtesy Copies to Judge re Dkts 145 and 146. Document filed by City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Thomas E. Kalaway, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago, Rogers Varner, Jr.(Zelcs, George)
September 26, 2016 Filing 147 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David E. Kovel dated September 26, 2016 re: Courtesy Copy of Reply Electronically Filed on September 23, 2016. Document filed by Richard Corbett, Brian Fisher.(Kovel, David)
September 26, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #149 MOTION for Richard A. Koffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12799465. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 23, 2016 Filing 146 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from George A. Zelcs dated September 23, 2016 re: Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Thomas E. Kalaway, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago, Rogers Varner, Jr.(Zelcs, George)
September 23, 2016 Filing 145 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #94 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP. MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP., #100 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Thomas E. Kalaway, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago, Rogers Varner, Jr. (Zelcs, George)
September 23, 2016 Filing 144 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Bradley J. Demuth dated September 23, 2016 re: Courtesy Copy of Breakwater Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of the Motion to Appoint Linda P. Nussbaum and Nussbaum Law Group, P.C. as a Lead Counsel. Document filed by BWT Professional Trading, LLC, Breakwater Trading LLC, Endeavor Trading, LLC, Marc Federighi, Michael St. John.(Demuth, Bradley)
September 23, 2016 Filing 143 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #78 MOTION to Appoint Linda P. Nussbaum and Nussbaum Law Group, P.C. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Breakwater Plaintiffs' Reply In Further Support of the Motion to Appoint Linda P. Nussbaum and Nussbaum Law Group, P.C. as a Lead Counsel. Document filed by BWT Professional Trading, LLC, Breakwater Trading LLC, Endeavor Trading, LLC, Marc Federighi, Michael St. John. (Nussbaum, Linda)
September 23, 2016 Filing 142 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #98 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel Alongside Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC and Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP., #88 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC., #86 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. . Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, State-Boston Retirement System, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. (Gay, Faith)
September 23, 2016 Filing 141 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (82 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 97 in 1:15-cv-07735-PGG) Memorandum of Law, (81 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 96 in 1:15-cv-07735-PGG) Notice (Other), Corbett Plaintiffs' Reply to Lead Counsel Motions. Document filed by Richard Corbett, Brian Fisher. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-07735-PGG(Kovel, David)
September 20, 2016 Filing 140 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from George A. Zelcs dated September 19, 2016 re: Joint Response of Plaintiffs In Support of Appointment as Interim Co-Lead Counsel of Korein Tillery, Scott+Scott, Hausfeld, and Kaplan Fox. Document filed by City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Thomas E. Kalaway, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago, Rogers Varner, Jr.(Zelcs, George)
September 19, 2016 Filing 139 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jeremy A. Lieberman dated 09/19/2016 re: Courtesy Copy. Document filed by Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., City of Providence, Rutgers Enhanced Insurance Company, United International Insurance Company.(Lieberman, Jeremy)
September 19, 2016 Filing 138 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth M. Zito on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Zito, Elizabeth)
September 19, 2016 Filing 137 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David E. Kovel dated September 19, 2016 re: courtesy copy of response electronically filed on September 16, 2016. Document filed by Richard Corbett, Brian Fisher.(Kovel, David)
September 16, 2016 Filing 136 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #94 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP. MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP., #100 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Thomas E. Kalaway, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago, Rogers Varner, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Zelcs, George)
September 16, 2016 Filing 135 DECLARATION of Vincent J. Esades in Support re: #100 MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Central Laborers' Pension Fund. (Esades, Vincent)
September 16, 2016 Filing 134 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: (94 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP. MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP. . Document filed by Rock Capital Markets, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Fata, Anthony)
September 16, 2016 Filing 133 RESPONSE re: (82 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 97 in 1:15-cv-07735-PGG) Memorandum of Law, (81 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 96 in 1:15-cv-07735-PGG) Notice (Other), In Support Of The Motion Of Korein Tillery LLC, Scott+Scott LLP, Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP and Hausfeld LLP For Appointment As Interim Co- Lead Counsel For The Entire Case And In Further Support Of Corbett Plaintiffs' Motion To Appoint Kirby McInerney LLP As Interim Lead Counsel For A Class Of Treasury Futures Traders. Document filed by Richard Corbett, Brian Fisher. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-07735-PGG(Kovel, David)
September 16, 2016 Filing 132 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #113 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Rutgers Enhanced Insurance Company, United International Insurance Company, City of Providence. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
September 16, 2016 Filing 131 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #85 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Statement in Support of Further Appointment of the Temporary Co-Lead Counsel and Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as Additional Co-Lead Class Counsel. Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP's Memorandum in Response in Further Support of Appointment of Temporary Co-Leads as Lead Counsel and For Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP to be Appointed as Fourth Co-Lead Counsel. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Laborers Local 100 and 397 Health and Welfare Fund. (Coughlin, Patrick)
September 16, 2016 Filing 130 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Bradley J. Demuth dated September 16, 2016 re: Courtesy Copy of Breakwater Plaintiffs' Response to Lead Counsel Motions. Document filed by BWT Professional Trading, LLC, Breakwater Trading LLC, Endeavor Trading, LLC, Marc Federighi, Michael St. John.(Demuth, Bradley)
September 16, 2016 Filing 129 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #78 MOTION to Appoint Linda P. Nussbaum and Nussbaum Law Group, P.C. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Breakwater Plaintiffs' Response to Lead Counsel Motions. Document filed by BWT Professional Trading, LLC, Breakwater Trading LLC, Endeavor Trading, LLC, Marc Federighi, Michael St. John. (Nussbaum, Linda)
September 16, 2016 Filing 128 RESPONSE re: #93 Brief,, Regarding the Application of IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund and City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System in Support of the Permanent Appointment of Temporary Lead Counsel or in the Alternative the Appointment of Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as an Additional Lead Counsel. Document filed by City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund. (Berman, Steve)
September 16, 2016 Filing 127 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: (98 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel Alongside Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC and Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP., (88 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC., (86 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. . Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Gay, Faith)
September 16, 2016 Filing 126 DECLARATION of R. Alexander Saveri in Support re: #100 MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Laborers Local 231 Pension Fund. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
September 16, 2016 Filing 125 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from W. Joseph Bruckner & Garrett D. Blanchfield dated 09/16/2016 re: in support of application of Hausfeld LLP, Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer, Scott+Scott and Korein Tillery for appointment as Co-Lead Counsel. Document filed by Twin City Iron Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Blanchfield, Garrett)
September 16, 2016 Filing 124 NOTICE of Support of Application for Appointment as Co-Lead Counsel. Document filed by The New Jersey Laborers Statewide Funds. (Isquith, Frederick)
September 16, 2016 Filing 123 DECLARATION of Joseph H. Meltzer in Support re: #98 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel Alongside Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC and Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP.. Document filed by Beaver County Employees' Retirement Fund(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Lackawanna County Employees' Retirement Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Meltzer, Joseph)
September 16, 2016 Filing 122 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #98 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel Alongside Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC and Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. . Document filed by Beaver County Employees' Retirement Fund(Individually), Erie County Employees' Retirement System, Lackawanna County Employees' Retirement Fund. (Meltzer, Joseph)
September 15, 2016 Filing 121 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 8/22/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 15, 2016 Filing 120 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 8/22/2016 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 15, 2016 Filing 119 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Leah Friedman. Document filed by RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Friedman, Leah)
September 9, 2016 Filing 118 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Louis F. Burke, Esq. dated September 9, 2016 re: In Support of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. Document filed by Robert L. Teel.(Burke, Louis)
September 9, 2016 Filing 117 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from George A. Zelcs dated September 7, 2016 re: Courtesy Copies to Judge re Dkts 94, 95 and 96. Document filed by City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, Thomas E. Kalaway, Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago.(Zelcs, George)
September 7, 2016 Filing 116 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Justin S. Nematzadeh dated September 7, 2016 Document filed by Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Rutgers Enhanced Insurance Company, United International Insurance Company.(Nematzadeh, Justin)
September 6, 2016 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support re: #113 MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Rutgers Enhanced Insurance Company, United International Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
September 6, 2016 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #113 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Rutgers Enhanced Insurance Company, United International Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
September 6, 2016 Filing 113 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Rutgers Enhanced Insurance Company, United International Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (75) MOTION for Daniel J. Veroff to Withdraw as Attorney. This motion for an order directing the withdrawal of Daniel J. Veroff as counsel for Plaintiffs Jane Franklin and Jonathan Richard Williamson ("Plaintiffs") is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. Daniel J. Veroff is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs and fully discharged from any further representation or obligation in this case. 2. Pillsbury & Coleman, LLP will continue to represent Plaintiffs in this action. 3. Daniel J. Veroff (email: dveroff@pillsburycoleman.com) is removed from the mailing matrix and from receiving electronic filings in this case. SO ORDERED. Attorney Daniel J Veroff terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/6/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (kl)
September 6, 2016 Filing 111 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (94 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP. MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP. . Document filed by Rock Capital Markets, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Fata, Anthony)
September 6, 2016 Filing 110 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Michael Eisenkraft dated September 6, 2016 re: courtesy copies of Application to Appoint Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC Interim Co-lead Class Counsel Alongside Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP. Document filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Eisenkraft, Michael)
September 6, 2016 Filing 109 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David E. Kovel dated September 6, 2016 re: courtesy copies of documents electronically filed on September 2, 2016. Document filed by Richard Corbett, Brian Fisher.(Kovel, David)
September 6, 2016 Filing 108 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jay L. Himes dated September 6, 2016 re: courtesy copies of Application to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel Alongside Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC and Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, State-Boston Retirement System.(Himes, Jay)
September 6, 2016 Filing 107 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Justin S. Nematzadeh dated September 6, 2016 Document filed by Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Rutgers Enhanced Insurance Company, United International Insurance Company.(Nematzadeh, Justin)
September 6, 2016 Filing 106 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert N. Kaplan dated September 6, 2016 re: courtesy copies of documents electronically filed on September 2, 2016. Document filed by Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.(Kaplan, Robert)
September 6, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Anthony F. Fata to RE-FILE Document (141 in 1:15-cv-05830-PGG, 150 in 1:15-cv-07385-PGG, 121 in 1:15-cv-06003-PGG, 138 in 1:15-cv-08287-PGG, 76 in 1:16-cv-01177-PGG, 70 in 1:15-cv-10116-PGG, 183 in 1:15-cv-06129-PGG, 191 in 1:15-cv-05957-PGG, 146 in 1:15-cv-05931-PGG, 103 in 1:15-cv-07325-PGG, 108 in 1:15-cv-07329-PGG, 184 in 1:15-cv-05794-PGG, 187 in 1:15-cv-05939-PGG, 66 in 1:15-cv-10118-PGG, 93 in 1:15-cv-07111-PGG, 135 in 1:15-cv-06782-PGG, 120 in 1:15-cv-06072-PGG, 99 in 1:15-cv-07481-PGG, 114 in 1:15-cv-06892-PGG, 218 in 1:15-cv-05807-PGG, 142 in 1:15-cv-07420-PGG, 152 in 1:15-cv-07390-PGG, 21 in 1:15-cv-09975-PGG, 92 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 107 in 1:15-cv-06853-PGG, 72 in 1:16-cv-00180-PGG, 99 in 1:15-cv-07735-PGG, 70 in 1:16-cv-00005-PGG, 135 in 1:15-cv-06139-PGG, 62 in 1:15-cv-09968-PGG, 31 in 1:16-cv-00030-PGG, 153 in 1:15-cv-07006-PGG, 121 in 1:15-cv-09803-PGG, 55 in 1:15-cv-10117-PGG, 37 in 1:15-cv-09169-PGG, 174 in 1:15-cv-06474-PGG, 138 in 1:15-cv-05843-PGG) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rock Capital, LLC's/Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP's Motion to Appoint Scott+Scott, Korein Tillery and Kellog Huber as Co-Lead Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rock Capital, LLC's/Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP's Motion to Appoint Scott+Scott, Korein Tillery and Kellog Huber as Co-Lead Counsel. Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. ***REMINDER*** - Motion to Appoint Counsel WAS NOT FILED. First file motion, then file and link any supporting documents. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(db)
September 6, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman to RE-FILE Document #103 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. ***REMINDER*** - Motion to Appoint Counsel WAS NOT FILED. First file motion, then file and link any supporting documents. (db)
September 6, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman to RE-FILE Document #104 Declaration in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Document(s) linked to filing error(s). (db)
September 5, 2016 Filing 105 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hugh Daniel Sandler on behalf of Michael St. John, BWT Professional Trading, LLC, Breakwater Trading LLC, Endeavor Trading, LLC, Marc Federighi, Michael St. John, Marc Federighi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05843-PGG, 1:15-cv-06139-PGG, 1:15-cv-07481-PGG(Sandler, Hugh)
September 2, 2016 Filing 104 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support re: #103 MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Rutgers Enhanced Insurance Company, United International Insurance Company. (Lieberman, Jeremy) Modified on 9/6/2016 (db).
September 2, 2016 Filing 103 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Rutgers Enhanced Insurance Company, United International Insurance Company.(Lieberman, Jeremy) Modified on 9/6/2016 (db).
September 2, 2016 Filing 102 DECLARATION of Robert N. Kaplan in Support re: #100 MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System. (Kaplan, Robert)
September 2, 2016 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #100 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System. (Kaplan, Robert)
September 2, 2016 Filing 100 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.(Kaplan, Robert)
September 2, 2016 Filing 99 DECLARATION of Jay L. Himes in Support re: #98 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel Alongside Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC and Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP.. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, State-Boston Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Himes, Jay)
September 2, 2016 Filing 98 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel Alongside Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC and Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, State-Boston Retirement System.(Himes, Jay)
September 2, 2016 Filing 97 MOTION for Daniel J. Veroff to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Jane Franklin, Jonathan Richard Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit of Ingrid S. Leverett, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-07329-PGG(Leverett, Ingrid)
September 2, 2016 Filing 96 DECLARATION of George A. Zelcs in Support re: #94 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP. MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP.. Document filed by City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, Thomas E. Kalaway, Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago, Rogers Varner, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Zelcs, George)
September 2, 2016 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #94 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP. MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP. . Document filed by City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, Thomas E. Kalaway, Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago, Rogers Varner, Jr. (Zelcs, George)
September 2, 2016 Filing 94 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP. Document filed by City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, Thomas E. Kalaway, Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago, Rogers Varner, Jr.(Zelcs, George)
September 2, 2016 Filing 93 BRIEF re: #70 Order, Set Deadlines,,,,,,,,,,,, Application of IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund and City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System in Support of The Permanent Appointment of Temporary Lead Counsel or in the Alternative the Appointment of Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as an Additional Lead Counsel. Document filed by City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Berman, Steve)
September 2, 2016 Filing 92 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rock Capital, LLC's/Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP's Motion to Appoint Scott+Scott, Korein Tillery and Kellog Huber as Co-Lead Counsel. Document filed by Rock Capital Markets, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Fata, Anthony) Modified on 9/6/2016 (db).
September 2, 2016 Filing 91 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Berger & Montague, P.C.. Document filed by United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Pension Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund.(Cramer, Eric)
September 2, 2016 Filing 90 DECLARATION of Michael B. Eisenkraft in Support re: #88 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC.. Document filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Richards, John)
September 2, 2016 Filing 89 DECLARATION of Patrick J. Coughlin in Support re: #85 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Statement in Support of Further Appointment of the Temporary Co-Lead Counsel and Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as Additional Co-Lead Class Counsel.. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Laborers Local 100 and 397 Health and Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - Trailblazers award)(Coughlin, Patrick)
September 2, 2016 Filing 88 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC. Document filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH.(Richards, John)
September 2, 2016 Filing 87 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #85 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Statement in Support of Further Appointment of the Temporary Co-Lead Counsel and Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as Additional Co-Lead Class Counsel. Statement in Support of Further Appointment of the Temporary Co-Lead Counsel and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Appointment of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as Additional Co-Lead Lead Class Counsel. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Laborers Local 100 and 397 Health and Welfare Fund. (Coughlin, Patrick)
September 2, 2016 Filing 86 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH.(Gay, Faith)
September 2, 2016 Filing 85 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Statement in Support of Further Appointment of the Temporary Co-Lead Counsel and Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as Additional Co-Lead Class Counsel. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Laborers Local 100 and 397 Health and Welfare Fund.(Coughlin, Patrick)
September 2, 2016 Filing 84 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Peter George Safirstein on behalf of Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH. New Address: Safirstein Metcalf LLP, 1250 Broadway, 27th Floor, New York, NY, USA 10001, (212) 201-2845. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-06782-PGG(Safirstein, Peter)
September 2, 2016 Filing 83 DECLARATION of David E. Kovel in Support re: (82 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 97 in 1:15-cv-07735-PGG) Memorandum of Law, (81 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 96 in 1:15-cv-07735-PGG) Notice (Other),. Document filed by Richard Corbett, Brian Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-07735-PGG(Kovel, David)
September 2, 2016 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: (81 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 96 in 1:15-cv-07735-PGG) Notice (Other), In Support of Motion of Plaintiffs Richard Corbett and Brian Fisher to Appoint Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Lead Counsel for a Class of Treasury Futures Traders. Document filed by Richard Corbett, Brian Fisher. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-07735-PGG(Kovel, David)
September 2, 2016 Filing 81 NOTICE of Motion of Plaintiffs Richard Corbett and Brian Fisher to Appoint Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Lead Counsel to Represent a Class of Treasury Futures Traders. Document filed by Richard Corbett, Brian Fisher. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-07735-PGG(Kovel, David)
September 2, 2016 Filing 80 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Bradley J. Demuth dated September 2, 2016 re: Courtesy Copies of Motion to Appoint Linda P. Nussbaum and Nussbaum Law Group, P.C. As a Lead Counsel and related ECF submissions. Document filed by BWT Professional Trading, LLC, Breakwater Trading LLC, Endeavor Trading, LLC, Marc Federighi, Michael St. John.(Demuth, Bradley)
September 2, 2016 Filing 79 DECLARATION of Bradley J. Demuth in Support re: #78 MOTION to Appoint Linda P. Nussbaum and Nussbaum Law Group, P.C. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by BWT Professional Trading, LLC, Breakwater Trading LLC, Endeavor Trading, LLC, Marc Federighi, Michael St. John. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stern Declaration, #2 Exhibit Schneider Declaration, #3 Exhibit Serbinski Declaration, #4 Exhibit Thelen Declaration, #5 Exhibit NLG Firm Bio, #6 Exhibit Breakwater Complaint, #7 Exhibit Forex Transcript)(Demuth, Bradley)
September 2, 2016 Filing 78 MOTION to Appoint Linda P. Nussbaum and Nussbaum Law Group, P.C. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by BWT Professional Trading, LLC, Breakwater Trading LLC, Endeavor Trading, LLC, Marc Federighi, Michael St. John.(Nussbaum, Linda)
September 1, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System. (Street, Whitney)
September 1, 2016 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Whitney Erin Street on behalf of Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System. (Street, Whitney)
September 1, 2016 Filing 75 MOTION for Daniel J. Veroff to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Jane Franklin, Jonathan Richard Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Leverett, Ingrid)
September 1, 2016 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ingrid S Leverett on behalf of Jane Franklin, Jonathan Richard Williamson. (Leverett, Ingrid)
September 1, 2016 Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Lee Grossman on behalf of Jane Franklin, Jonathan Richard Williamson. (Grossman, Richard)
August 31, 2016 Filing 72 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Appearance of Peter A. Barile III. Document filed by Air Conditioning and Refrigeration Industry Retirement Trust. (Barile, Peter)
August 25, 2016 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Anthony Barile, III on behalf of City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, Thomas E. Kalaway, Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago. (Barile, Peter)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: After consultation with counsel for the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule will apply to motions to appoint lead counsel, submissions concerning the plaintiffs' steering committee, the filing of a Consolidated Amended Complaint, and any motion to dismiss: 1. As to motions to appoint lead counsel: a. Moving papers must be filed by September 2, 2016, and are limited to 15 pages; b. Responses are due on September 16, 2016, and are limited to 10 pages; and c. Reply briefs, if any, are due on September 23, 2016, and are limited to 7 pages. 2. Within fourteen days of appointment of lead counsel, lead counsel will make a recommendation to the Court as to the membership and size of the plaintiffs' steering committee. Any party objecting to lead counsel's recommendation will file its objection with the Court within seven days. 3. The Consolidated Amended Complaint will be filed 60 days after the appointment of lead counsel. 4. Any motion to dismiss will be filed 60 days after the filing of the Consolidated Amended Complaint. Winston & Strawn LLP, Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP, and Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP will serve as liaison counsel for Defendants. The attached Schedule A reflects the cases that have been consolidated for pretrial purposes. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 9/2/2016., Responses due by 9/16/2016, Replies due by 9/23/2016.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/22/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(kl)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #68 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Attorney Ethan Edward Litwin terminated (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/22/2016) (kl)
August 22, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/22/2016. (Court Reporter Sonya Huggins) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(mr)
August 19, 2016 Filing 68 MOTION for Ethan E. Litwin to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald & Co..(Havalic, Malik)
August 19, 2016 Filing 67 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Faith E. Gay dated August 19, 2016 re: Additions to Schedule of Consolidated Cases. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Gay, Faith)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference scheduled for Monday, August 22, 2016 at 10:30 a.m., will take place in Courtroom 110 at the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. It is further ORDERED that Schedule A, which reflects the cases that have been consolidated for pretrial purposes, is modified as reflected in the attached version. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(kl)
August 17, 2016 Filing 65 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Market Inc., Commerz Markets LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, Jeffries LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System.(Kaplan, Robert) Modified on 8/18/2016 (dgo). Modified on 8/18/2016 (pc).
August 16, 2016 Filing 64 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert N. Kaplan dated August 16 2016 re: Defendants' August 10 2016 Letter (ECF No. 62). Document filed by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System.(Kaplan, Robert)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (60) Motion for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al., per Chambers. (kko)
August 10, 2016 Filing 62 RESPONSE re: #59 Letter, #57 Letter . Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Woll, David)
August 5, 2016 Filing 61 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bank of America Corp..(Schmidtlein, John)
August 5, 2016 Filing 60 MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12619271. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bank of America Corp..(Schmidtlein, John)
August 5, 2016 Filing 59 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jay L Himes dated August 5, 2016 re: August 4, 2016 letter from Robert Kaplan. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System.(Himes, Jay)
August 5, 2016 Filing 58 MOTION for Alexis A. Lien to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Collogan, Lauren)
August 5, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #60 MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12619271. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 4, 2016 Filing 57 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert N. Kaplan dated 08/04/2016 re: Addition to Proposed Agenda for August 22, 2016 Initial Conference. Document filed by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System.(Kaplan, Robert)
August 4, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (56 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 181 in 1:15-cv-05939-PGG) MOTION for Jeffrey L. Spector to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12611684. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., (180 in 1:15-cv-05939-PGG, 55 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) MOTION for William G. Caldes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12611620. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05939-PGG(bcu)
August 3, 2016 Filing 56 MOTION for Jeffrey L. Spector to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12611684. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Inter-Local Pension Fund Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05939-PGG(Spector, Jeffrey)
August 3, 2016 Filing 55 MOTION for William G. Caldes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12611620. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Inter-Local Pension Fund Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05939-PGG(Caldes, William)
August 1, 2016 Filing 54 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Peter Anthony Barile, III on behalf of City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, Thomas E. Kalaway, Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago. New Address: Scott+Scott, Attorneys at Law, LLP, 230 Park Avenue, 17th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10169, 212-223-6444. (Barile, Peter)
August 1, 2016 Filing 53 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Thomas Kay Boardman on behalf of City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, Thomas E. Kalaway, Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago. New Address: Scott+Scott, Attorneys at Law, LLP, 230 Park Avenue, 17th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10169, 212-223-6444. (Boardman, Thomas)
July 29, 2016 Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jay L Himes dated July 29, 2016 re: Order, Dkt. 35, Sec. IX.B. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Conf. Agenda, #2 Proposed Case Schedule)(Himes, Jay)
July 27, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharon Kunjumon Robertson on behalf of Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, American Federation of Teachers, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-06782-PGG, 1:16-cv-00180-PGG, 1:16-cv-01177-PGG(Robertson, Sharon)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING DIRECT FILING OF CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK FOR THE PURPOSES OF PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties and their respective counsel as follows: 1. Plaintiffs who file a Direct Filed Case are required to designate for each such case the original venue in which the case would have been filed but for the direct filing procedure (the "Designated Forum"). 2. Each Direct Filed Case filed in accordance with the direct filing procedure will be deemed to have been originally filed in the Designated Forum. 3. For any Direct Filed Case that meets the conditions set forth in paragraphs 1 and 2 above, Defendants will not object that the Southern District of New York is an improper venue for such Case. 4. Upon completion of all pretrial proceedings applicable to a Direct Filed Case, this Court, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), may transfer that case to the Designated Forum, after considering the recommendations of the parties to that case. 5. Except for an objection that the Southern District of New York is an improper venue for a Direct Filed Case, all other rights, arguments and defenses of Defendants are preserved and not waived, including, but not limited to, whether the Designated Forum is an improper venue and whether a Defendant is subject to personal jurisdiction in the Designated Forum. 6. Any plaintiff filing a Direct Filed Case who objects to any part of this Stipulation and [Proposed] Order shall have 10 days from the date that its case is filed to file a notice of motion with the Court to bring on a motion asserting such objection, and setting forth the basis for objection. If such a motion is granted in a Direct Filed Case, Defendants shall not be bound by the terms of this Stipulation and [Proposed] Order with respect to that case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/26/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(kl)
July 22, 2016 Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David J. Woll dated July 22, 2016 re: June 13, 2016 Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Woll, David)
July 21, 2016 Filing 48 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Richard A. Rosen, David J. Woll, and Elizabeth P. Papez dated July 21, 2016 re: Status. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC.(Rosen, Richard)
July 21, 2016 Filing 47 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jay L Himes dated July 21, 2016 re: Order, Dkt. 35, Sec. IX.A. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System.(Himes, Jay)
July 15, 2016 Filing 46 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eugene A. Spector, et al. dated July 15, 2016 re: Consensus re Appointment of Lead Counsel. Document filed by City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Thomas E. Kalaway, Laborers Local 231 Pension Fund, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago, Twin City Iron Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Pension Fund, University of Puerto Rico Retirement System, Rogers Varner, Jr.(Spector, Eugene)
July 15, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE of Filing of Updated Exhibit B to Letter of 7/14/2016 re: (130 in 1:15-cv-05843-PGG, 183 in 1:15-cv-05957-PGG, 112 in 1:15-cv-06072-PGG, 134 in 1:15-cv-07420-PGG, 54 in 1:15-cv-09968-PGG, 113 in 1:15-cv-06003-PGG, 210 in 1:15-cv-05807-PGG, 175 in 1:15-cv-06129-PGG, 138 in 1:15-cv-05931-PGG, 99 in 1:15-cv-06853-PGG, 88 in 1:15-cv-07735-PGG, 133 in 1:15-cv-05830-PGG, 125 in 1:15-cv-06782-PGG, 63 in 1:16-cv-00180-PGG, 62 in 1:16-cv-00005-PGG, 44 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 29 in 1:15-cv-09169-PGG, 85 in 1:15-cv-07111-PGG, 106 in 1:15-cv-06892-PGG, 13 in 1:15-cv-09975-PGG, 176 in 1:15-cv-05794-PGG, 127 in 1:15-cv-06139-PGG, 145 in 1:15-cv-07006-PGG, 113 in 1:15-cv-09803-PGG, 142 in 1:15-cv-07385-PGG, 62 in 1:15-cv-10116-PGG, 91 in 1:15-cv-07481-PGG, 47 in 1:15-cv-10117-PGG, 100 in 1:15-cv-07329-PGG, 23 in 1:16-cv-00030-PGG, 67 in 1:16-cv-01177-PGG, 144 in 1:15-cv-07390-PGG, 177 in 1:15-cv-05939-PGG, 95 in 1:15-cv-07325-PGG, 165 in 1:15-cv-06474-PGG, 130 in 1:15-cv-08287-PGG, 58 in 1:15-cv-10118-PGG) Letter,,. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, State-Boston Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Updated Exhibit B to Letter of 7/14/2016)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Himes, Jay)
July 14, 2016 Filing 44 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jay L. Himes, J. Douglas Richards and Faith E. Gay dated 07/14/2016 re: Plaintiffs' counsel's views re lead and liaison counsel, a Plaintiffs' steering committee, and proposed method and schedule re appointment of lead and liaison counsel. Document filed by State-Boston Retirement System, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Himes, Jay)
July 13, 2016 Filing 43 MOTION for Henry B. Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12533215. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P Morgan Securities LLC, JP. Morgan Securities, LLC., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Liu, Henry)
July 13, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #43 MOTION for Henry B. Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12533215. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 11, 2016 Filing 42 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Lesley E. Weaver dated July 11, 2016 re: Requesting action be placed on Schedule A to the Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (Dkt. 35). Document filed by Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.(Weaver, Lesley)
July 7, 2016 Filing 41 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David J. Woll dated July 7, 2016 re: the protocol for the direct filing of additional cases in this District. Document filed by 3RED TRADING LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corp., Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Market Inc., Commerz Markets LLC, Countrywide Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, Jeffries LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Woll, David)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #39 Letter filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' response, if any, is due on July 21, 2016. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/5/2016) (kl)
June 30, 2016 Filing 39 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David J. Woll dated June 30, 2016 re: Order dated June 13, 2016. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Woll, David)
June 28, 2016 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie Szaro Heglund on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc.. (Heglund, Stephanie)
June 23, 2016 Filing 37 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jeffrey S. Abraham dated 06/23/2016 re: University of Puerto Rico Retirement System et al. v. Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, et al.; Case No. 15-cv-08484. Document filed by University of Puerto Rico Retirement System.(Abraham, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2016 Filing 36 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from William C. Carmody dated June 15, 2016 re: Action be placed on Schedule A to the Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (Dkt. 35). Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland.(Carmody, William)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The civil actions listed on Schedule A are consolidated for pretrial purposes. Any "tag-along" actions later removed to or transferred to this Court, or directly filed in the Southern District of New York, will automatically be consolidated with this action without the necessity of future motions or orders. This consolidation, however, does not constitute a determination that the actions should be consolidated for trial, nor does it have the effect of making any entity a party to any action in which he, she, or it has not been named, served, or added in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. In the Court's view, a master case file limited to filings of significance to the MDL as a whole or a substantial number of member cases would be advantageous. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to open a master case file bearing docket number 16-MC-2673. Any filing fees associated with opening the master case file docket are waived. The caption shall read "In re: Treasury Securities Auction Antitrust Litigation." For administrative purposes only, in 16-MC-2673, Plaintiffs shall be listed as "Treasury Securities Auction Antitrust MDL Plaintiffs," and Defendants shall be listed as "Treasury Securities Auction Antitrust MDL Defendants." There will be no appearances entered unless and until the Court orders otherwise. The Court will transfer any and all relevant documents filed in 15-MD-2673 to 15-MD-2673. This Order and all subsequent entries docketed in 16-MC-2543 are to be docketed simultaneously in 15-MD-2673. The Clerk of the Court is directed to Transfer Docket No. 1 (Transfer Order) from 15-MD-2673 to 16-MC-2673. The Court will conduct an Initial Conference on Monday, August 22, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 at the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. Counsel shall check in with the Courtroom Deputy at least fifteen minutes in advance. This Order vacates any case management or scheduling order issued by a court prior to the transfer of a case to 15-MD-2673. Pending the Initial Conference and further orders of this Court, all deadlines in this action (except those set forth herein), including Defendants' time to respond to any of the complaints and all discovery deadlines, are stayed. This Order does not, however, preclude the provision of voluntary discovery by any party. Any and all pending motions in the transferor courts are denied without prejudice, and will be adjudicated under the procedures set forth in this Order and subsequent orders issued by this Court. (As further set forth in this Order) Initial Conference set for 8/22/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/13/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(kl)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (33) Motion for Shannon Price Torres to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Shannon Price Torres terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/7/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (kl)
June 6, 2016 Filing 33 MOTION for Shannon Price Torres to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..(Mason, Omari)
June 3, 2016 Filing 32 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Bradley J. Demuth on behalf of Marc Federighi, Michael St. John, Breakwater Trading LLC, BWT Professional Trading, LLC, Endeavor Trading, LLC. New Address: Nussbaum Law Group, P.C., 1211 Avenue of the Americas, FL 40, New York, NY, United States 10036, 9174389102. (Demuth, Bradley)
June 3, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Linda P. Nussbaum on behalf of Michael St. John, Endeavor Trading, LLC, Marc Federighi. New Address: Nussbaum Law Group, P.C., 1211 Avenue of the Americas, 40th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10036-8718, (917) 438-9102. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05843-PGG, 1:15-cv-06139-PGG, 1:15-cv-07481-PGG(Nussbaum, Linda)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT as of March 1, 2016, I, Joanna Shally, will no longer be an employee of Shearman & Sterling LLP and hereby withdraw as counsel of record for defendant Mizuho Securities USA Inc. ("Mizuho") in the above-captioned action and all related actions listed on the attached Exhibit 1. I respectfully request to be removed from the Court's service list for the above-captioned action and all related actions listed on Exhibit 1. Shearman & Sterling LLP continues to serve as counsel for Mizuho in this action and the listed related actions through its attorneys, counsel of record Stuart J. Baskin, Jerome S. Fortinsky, and H. Miriam Farber. Please direct all future correspondence and papers in this action and the listed related actions to Mr. Baskin, Mr. Fortinsky, and Ms. Farber. SO ORDERED. Attorney Joanna Shally terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/2/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(kl)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (28 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) Letter filed by Brian Fisher, Richard Corbett, (80 in 1:15-cv-07735-PGG) Letter filed by Brian Fisher, Richard Corbett. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/8/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-07735-PGG(kl)
April 7, 2016 Filing 28 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David E. Kovel dated April 7, 2016 re: Consolidation. Document filed by Richard Corbett, Brian Fisher.(Kovel, David)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #23 Letter filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, State-Boston Retirement System. Accordingly, we respectfully request that the Court consolidate these actions as well, so that a briefing schedule may be set for the appointment of interim lead counsel (which briefing schedule was vacated during the proceedings before the JPML, see Boston Retirement, ECF No. 154). ENDORSEMENT: The Application is Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/24/2016) (ama)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #25 Letter filed by Air Conditioning and Refrigeration Industry Retirement Trust. I respectfully request Your Honor to consolidate Air Conditioning and Refrigeration Industry Retirement Trust v. Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency et al., No. 15-cv-08287 (S.D.N.Y.) with the MDL Master Docket, pursuant to the Judicial Panel on MultidistrictLitigation Transfer Order dated December 8, 2015, transferring related cases pending in the In re Treasury Securities Auction Antitrust Litigation MDL to this Court. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/24/2016) (ama)
March 23, 2016 Filing 25 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert G. Eisler dated March 23, 2016 re: Consolidating related case. Document filed by Air Conditioning and Refrigeration Industry Retirement Trust.(Eisler, Robert)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION SETTING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT AND FOR THE PARTIES TO PROPOSE CERTAIN CASE MANAGEMENT DATES: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. The undersigned counsel accept service of the complaint in the Uniqa Capital Markets case and the American Federation of Teachers case (the "Complaints") on behalf of their respective clients, expressly reserving the right to contest whether any party in the Complaints is properly named, and without waiver of any defenses, including those related to personal jurisdiction and venue, except as to the sufficiency of process and the service of process. 2. Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaints is hereby suspended until such time as the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York enters a scheduling order for the Consolidated Cases and Related Cases, provided that the parties shall confer in good faith regarding a proposed schedule for filing and responding to any consolidated complaint. 3. If Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to a complaint in any Consolidated Case, Related Case, or other pending action, is not similarly suspended pending a scheduling order for the Consolidated Cases and Related Cases, the parties shall meet and confer in good faith concerning the schedule in such action, with each side preserving all rights to apply to this Court or any other Court of competent jurisdiction for appropriate relief. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/22/2016) (kl)
March 22, 2016 Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory S. Asciolla dated 03/22/2016 re: consolidating related cases and setting briefing schedule for appointment of interim lead counsel. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, State-Boston Retirement System.(Asciolla, Gregory)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION SETTING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT: The undersigned counsel have accepted service of the Amended Complaint in the above-captioned lawsuit on behalf of their respective clients, expressly reserving the right to contest whether any party in the Amended Complaint is properly named, and without waiver of any defenses, including those related to personal jurisdiction and venue, except as to the sufficiency of process and the service of process. For the avoidance of doubt, Plaintiff contends that Defendants have already been served properly in this matter. Unless the Court issues a contrary order, Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is hereby suspended until such time as the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York enters any order governing the time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint or enters an order coordinating or consolidating the foregoing cases and any Related Actions, provided that: upon resolution of proceedings concerning coordination or consolidation of the foregoing cases and any Related Actions, the parties shall confer in good faith regarding a proposed schedule for filing and responding to any consolidated complaint, unless the Court enters an order governing the time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint. If Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to a complaint in any Related Action or other pending action is not similarly suspended pending the coordination or consolidation proceedings, unless the Court issues a contrary ruling, the parties shall meet and confer in good faith concerning the schedule in this action, with each side preserving all rights to apply to this Court or any other Court of competent jurisdiction for appropriate relief, unless the Court enters an order governing the time to answer, move or otherwise respond to this Amended Complaint or any such complaint. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/9/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-07325-PGG(tn)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (19) MOTION for Domenico Minerva to Withdraw as Attorney. Plaintiffs' motion for an order directing the withdrawal of Domenico Minerva as counsel for Plaintiffs is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Attorney Domenico George Minerva terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/8/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-05794-PGG, 1:15-cv-06782-PGG (adc)
March 7, 2016 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Domenico Minerva in Support re: #19 MOTION for Domenico Minerva to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH. (Minerva, Domenico)
March 7, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION for Domenico Minerva to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Minerva, Domenico)
February 26, 2016 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3RED TRADING LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Market Inc., Commerz Markets LLC, Countrywide Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, Jeffries LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Rogers Varner, Jr.(Hall, Joseph)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL granting #16 MOTION for Krista Friedrich to Withdraw as Attorney. This matter having come before the Court by the filing of a Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for defendant Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC ("Credit Suisse") by Krista Friedrich, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED and ADJUDGED as follows: 1. Krista Friedrich is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Credit Suisse and fully discharged from any further representation or obligation in this case. 2. Remaining counsel of record will continue to represent Credit Suisse. 3. Krista Friedrich (email: kfriedrich@cahill.com) is removed from the mailing matrix and from receiving electronic filings in this case. SO ORDERED. (Attorney Krista Ann Friedrich terminated.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/26/2016) (adc)
February 24, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION for Krista Friedrich to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Krista Friedrich)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Friedrich, Krista)
February 17, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by H. Miriam Farber on behalf of Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Mizuho Securities USA, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Farber, H.)
February 9, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION for R. Bryant McCulley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11935590. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Rogers Varner, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B-Proposed Order)(McCulley, R.)
February 9, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for R. Bryant McCulley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11935590. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
February 2, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jonathan L. Shapiro. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Shapiro, Jonathan)
February 2, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jonathan L. Shapiro. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Shapiro, Jonathan)
January 26, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Stuart Halkett McCluer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11876602. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #10 MOTION for George C. Aguilar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11840434. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
January 25, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION for Stuart Halkett McCluer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11876602. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Rogers Varner, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(McCluer, Stuart)
January 14, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION for George C. Aguilar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11840434. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Police Retirement System of St Louis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 1:15-cv-09968-PGG(Aguilar, George)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JON R. ROELLKE granting #6 Motion for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/13/2016) (tn)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ANTHONY R. VAN VUREN granting #7 Motion for Anthony R. Van Vuren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/13/2016) (tn)
January 7, 2016 Filing 7 MOTION for Anthony R. Van Vuren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11810653. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jeffries LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Vuren, Anthony)
January 7, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11810473. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jeffries LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roellke, Jon)
January 7, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11810473. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #7 MOTION for Anthony R. Van Vuren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11810653. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
January 6, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Rachel M. Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Receipt no. 0208-11801236). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #5 MOTION for John R Kastl to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11802110. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
January 5, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION for John R Kastl to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11802110. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 3RED TRADING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kastl, John)
January 5, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION for Rachel M. Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Receipt no. 0208-11801236). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 3RED TRADING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Rachel)
January 5, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sandra Denise Hauser on behalf of 3RED TRADING LLC. (Hauser, Sandra)
December 21, 2015 Filing 2 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-1)transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Alabama and Illinois, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Paul G. Gardephe, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/17/2015) (sjo)
December 16, 2015 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Illinis, New York and Virgin Islands, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Paul G. Gardephe, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/08/2015) (sjo)
December 16, 2015 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (sjo)
December 16, 2015 CASES ORIGINATING FROM THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK: 1:15-cv-05794(PGG), 1:15-cv-05807(PGG), 1;15-cv-05830(PGG), 1:15-cv-05843(PGG), 1:15-cv-05931(PGG), 1:15-cv-05939(PGG), 1:15-cv-05957(PGG), 1:15-cv-06003(PGG),1:15-cv-06072 (PGG), 1:15-cv-06129(PGG), 1:15-cv-06139(PGG), 1:15-cv-06474(PGG), 1:15-cv-06782(PGG), 1:15-cv-06853(PGG), 1:15-cv-06892(PGG), 1:15-cv-07006(PGG), 1:15-cv-07111(PGG), 1:15-cv-07325(PGG), 1:15-cv-07329(PGG), 1:15-cv-07385(PGG), 1:15-cv-07390(PGG), 1:15-cv-07420(PGG), 1:15-cv-07481(PGG). (sjo)
December 16, 2015 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Treasury Securities Auction Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beaver County Employees' Retirement Fund
Represented By: Robert E. Connolly
Represented By: Andrew Hays Gorey
Represented By: Sharan Nirmul
Represented By: Kimberly A. Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Laborers' Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Teel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lackawanna County Employees' Retirement Fund
Represented By: Andrew Hays Gorey
Represented By: Sharan Nirmul
Represented By: Kimberly A. Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M & N Trading
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rock Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Anthony F. Fata
Represented By: Daniel O. Herrera
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Jennifer Winter Sprengel
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Robert White Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Retirement System
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Robert White Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rutgers Enhanced Insurance Company
Represented By: Justin Solomon Nematzadeh
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CNB Bancorp, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Charles Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The New Jersey Laborers Statewide Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United International Insurance Company
Represented By: Justin Solomon Nematzadeh
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System
Represented By: Jeff D. Friedman
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jason Allen Zweig
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Robert White Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Pension Fund
Represented By: Joseph Richard Saveri
Represented By: Matthew S. Weiler
Represented By: Andrew Michael Purdy
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System
Represented By: Walter W. Noss
Represented By: Thomas Kay Boardman
Represented By: Christopher M. Burke
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Coughlin
Represented By: Douglas L Capdeville
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breakwater Trading LLC
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Represented By: Hugh Daniel Sandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago
Represented By: Thomas Kay Boardman
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Represented By: Jason Aron Uris
Represented By: Donald R. Hall, Jr
Represented By: Frederic Scott Fox, Sr
Represented By: Lauren Ilene Dubick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Endeavor Trading, LLC
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Represented By: Hugh Daniel Sandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Franklin
Represented By: Daniel J Veroff
Represented By: Scott Madison Riemer
Represented By: Paul Michael Kampfer
Represented By: Ingrid S Leverett
Represented By: Sharon Hee Lee
Represented By: Richard Lee Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State-Boston Retirement System
Represented By: Garrett J. Bradley
Represented By: Michael Walter Stocker
Represented By: Lawrence Alan Sucharow
Represented By: Jay L. Himes
Represented By: Robin Ann Van Der Meulen
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Perez
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Gregory Scott Asciolla
Represented By: Valentina Trillo Meth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Jeff D. Friedman
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jason Allen Zweig
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Robert White Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund
Represented By: Kenneth Bruce Pickle
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Patrick Fanning Madden
Represented By: Merrill G Davidoff
Represented By: David Francis Sorensen
Represented By: John D. Radice
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Eric L. Cramer
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Robert White Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael St. John
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Represented By: Hugh Daniel Sandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas Teacher Retirement System
Represented By: Michael Walter Stocker
Represented By: Jay L. Himes
Represented By: Robin Ann Van Der Meulen
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Perez
Represented By: Eric James Belfi
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Gregory Scott Asciolla
Represented By: Valentina Trillo Meth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Whitney Erin Street
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Robert White Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Kalaway
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Providence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Smith
Represented By: Alberto Rodriguez
Represented By: Joseph M Vanek
Represented By: David P. Germaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: Heidi M. Silton
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spector
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jagher
Represented By: Anna Marie Horning Nygren
Represented By: W. Joseph Bruckner
Represented By: Aaron Harold Pierce
Represented By: Eugene A. Spector
Represented By: William G. Caldes
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Represented By: Robert Mark Roseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund
Represented By: Domenico George Minerva
Represented By: David A. Young
Represented By: Alison Deich
Represented By: John Douglas Richards
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Represented By: Steig Olson
Represented By: Sascha Nicholas Rand
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Thomas Popejoy
Represented By: Jordan Ari Goldstein
Represented By: Adam Michael Abensohn
Represented By: Richard A. Koffman
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Thomas Lepri
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Adam Bryan Wolfson
Represented By: Christine H. Chung
Represented By: Alison Sarah Deich
Represented By: Robert White Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Police Retirement System of St Louis
Represented By: George C. Aguilar
Represented By: Norman Rifkind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Richard Williamson
Represented By: Ingrid S Leverett
Represented By: Scott Madison Riemer
Represented By: Paul Michael Kampfer
Represented By: Sharon Hee Lee
Represented By: Richard Lee Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH
Represented By: Christopher R. Barker
Represented By: Carol V. Gilden
Represented By: Domenico George Minerva
Represented By: David A. Young
Represented By: Jeremy Daniel Andersen
Represented By: Alison Deich
Represented By: John Douglas Richards
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Represented By: Steig Olson
Represented By: Karl Stern
Represented By: Sascha Nicholas Rand
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Thomas Popejoy
Represented By: Jordan Ari Goldstein
Represented By: Adam Michael Abensohn
Represented By: Richard A. Koffman
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Thomas Lepri
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Adam Bryan Wolfson
Represented By: Christine H. Chung
Represented By: Alison Sarah Deich
Represented By: Robert White Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Christopher R. Barker
Represented By: Carol V. Gilden
Represented By: Domenico George Minerva
Represented By: David A. Young
Represented By: Jeremy Daniel Andersen
Represented By: Alison Deich
Represented By: John Douglas Richards
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Represented By: Steig Olson
Represented By: Karl Stern
Represented By: Sascha Nicholas Rand
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Thomas Popejoy
Represented By: Jordan Ari Goldstein
Represented By: Adam Michael Abensohn
Represented By: Richard A. Koffman
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Thomas Lepri
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Adam Bryan Wolfson
Represented By: Christine H. Chung
Represented By: Alison Sarah Deich
Represented By: Robert White Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Federighi
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Represented By: Hugh Daniel Sandler
Represented By: Bradley J. Demuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Robert White Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erie County Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Andrew Hays Gorey
Represented By: Sharan Nirmul
Represented By: Kimberly A. Justice
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Robert White Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BWT Professional Trading, LLC
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Represented By: Hugh Daniel Sandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: American Federation of Teachers
Represented By: Carol V. Gilden
Represented By: Jeremy Daniel Andersen
Represented By: Alison Deich
Represented By: John Douglas Richards
Represented By: Sharon Kunjumon Robertson
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Thomas Popejoy
Represented By: Jordan Ari Goldstein
Represented By: Adam Michael Abensohn
Represented By: Richard A. Koffman
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Thomas Lepri
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Christine H. Chung
Represented By: Alison Sarah Deich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH
Represented By: Carol V. Gilden
Represented By: Jeremy Daniel Andersen
Represented By: Alison Deich
Represented By: Daniel Paul Cunningham
Represented By: John Douglas Richards
Represented By: Sharon Kunjumon Robertson
Represented By: Karl Stern
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Thomas Popejoy
Represented By: Jordan Ari Goldstein
Represented By: Adam Michael Abensohn
Represented By: Richard A. Koffman
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Thomas Lepri
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Adam Bryan Wolfson
Represented By: David Leray
Represented By: Christine H. Chung
Represented By: Alison Sarah Deich
Represented By: Robert White Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rogers Varner, Jr.
Represented By: R. Bryant McCulley
Represented By: Stuart Halkett McCluer
Represented By: Joseph Solomon Hall
Represented By: Michael John Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Laborers Local 231 Pension Fund
Represented By: Aaron Harold Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Richard Corbett
Represented By: Thomas W. Elrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Laborers Local 100 and 397 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Coughlin
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Justin Solomon Nematzadeh
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Robert White Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Brian O. O'Mara
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Coughlin
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Dana Statsky Smith
Represented By: Randi Dawn Bandman
Represented By: Stanley D Bernstein
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Robert White Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Twin City Iron Workers Pension Fund
Represented By: Thomas James Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Twin City Iron Workers Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Brian Philip Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Torus Capital LLC
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Alison Deich
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Thomas Popejoy
Represented By: Jordan Ari Goldstein
Represented By: Adam Michael Abensohn
Represented By: Richard A. Koffman
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Thomas Lepri
Represented By: Christine H. Chung
Represented By: Alison Sarah Deich
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Robert White Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Marina Fouts
Represented By: Paul J. Scarlato
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Alan L Rosca
Represented By: Marc Edelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brian Fisher
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Thomas W. Elrod
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Alaska Electrical Pension Fund
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Brian O. O'Mara
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Coughlin
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Robert White Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Air Conditioning and Refrigeration Industry Retirement Trust
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Represented By: Jay W. Eisenhofer
Represented By: Robert Gerard Eisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Brian O. O'Mara
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Coughlin
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Randi Dawn Bandman
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Robert White Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Pamela Addison Miller
Represented By: Edward Nathaniel Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffries LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Ian Schacter
Represented By: Jon Randall Roellke
Represented By: Anthony R. Van Vuren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank, PLC
Represented By: Stephanie Szaro Heglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC
Represented By: Carol Szurkowski
Represented By: Henry Liu
Represented By: Mark Putnam Gimbel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Nova Scotia
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Represented By: John Joseph Hughes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Richard A. Rosen
Represented By: Adam Block Schwartz
Represented By: Susanna Michele Buergel
Represented By: Kenneth Anthony Gallo
Represented By: Brad Scott Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Represented By: James Patrick Tallon, II
Represented By: Agnes Dunogue
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp.
Represented By: Carol Szurkowski
Represented By: Robert D. Wick
Represented By: Claire Catalano Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.
Represented By: Malik Havalic
Represented By: William J. Kolasky
Represented By: David A. Paul
Represented By: Ethan Edward Litwin
Represented By: Michael Steven Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P.Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Carol Szurkowski
Represented By: Henry Liu
Represented By: Robert D. Wick
Represented By: Mark Putnam Gimbel
Represented By: Claire Catalano Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Securities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Market Inc.
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse International
Represented By: Tara Halsch Curtin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerz Markets LLC
Represented By: Sean Miles Murphy
Represented By: Mark David Villaverde
Represented By: David Robert Gelfand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc.
Represented By: Gary P. Naftalis
Represented By: Tobias B. Jacoby
Represented By: Alan Roy Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Represented By: John Joseph Hughes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Americas Securities LLC
Represented By: David C. Esseks
Represented By: Todd Steven Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Represented By: Robert Y. Sperling
Represented By: Maya Krugman
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Papez
Represented By: Susannah Providence Torpey
Represented By: Jonathan Lucas Shapiro
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Represented By: Stephen Ehrenberg
Represented By: Penny Shane, II
Represented By: Staci Lynn Yablon
Represented By: Jonathan Sloan Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Securities Inc.
Represented By: Joel M. Cohen
Represented By: Melissa Carrie King
Represented By: Greg Donald Andres
Represented By: Maude Paquin
Represented By: Paul Steel Mishkin
Represented By: Olga Kogan
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradeweb Markets LLC
Represented By: Jon Randall Roellke
Represented By: Anthony R. Van Vuren
Represented By: Stacey Anne Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp.
Represented By: John D. Friel
Represented By: David J. Yeres
Represented By: Robert G. Houck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Joel Steven Sanders
Represented By: Gabrielle Frances Levin
Represented By: Melanie L. Katsur
Represented By: Mark Adam Kirsch
Represented By: David Jarrett Arp
Represented By: Melanie Leigh Katsur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Government Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIBC World Markets Corp.
Represented By: Lloyd S Clareman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiGroup, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Lauren Kristina Collogan
Represented By: Jesse T. Smallwood
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Alexis Lien
Represented By: Nicholas James Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Gabrielle Lisa Gould
Represented By: Marshall Howard Fishman
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Zito
Represented By: Leah Friedman
Represented By: Sophie-Charlotte Rohnke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Securities International Inc.
Represented By: Steven Lyon Holley
Represented By: Amanda Flug Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: David Elbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Knox
Represented By: Jonathan Myers
Represented By: Shannon Price Torres
Represented By: Omari Largos Royter Mason
Represented By: Thomas C. Rice
Represented By: Esinam Mawuena Daisy Agbemenu
Represented By: David J. Woll
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Campbell
Represented By: Kavitha Satya Sivashanker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: David George Januszewski
Represented By: Tara Halsch Curtin
Represented By: Thorn Rosenthal
Represented By: Elai E. Katz
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer
Represented By: Krista Ann Friedrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Szaro Heglund
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Schwartz
Represented By: David Harold Braff
Represented By: Kathleen Suzanne McArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Kennedy Park
Represented By: Nowell D. Bamberger
Represented By: Brian Byrne
Represented By: Caroline W. Stanton
Represented By: Breon Stacey Peace
Represented By: Lewis J. Liman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Group AG
Represented By: Tara Halsch Curtin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3RED TRADING LLC
Represented By: Rachel Marie Cannon
Represented By: Sandra Denise Hauser
Represented By: Stephen J. Senderowitz
Represented By: John Richard Kastl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Jon Randall Roellke
Represented By: Anthony R. Van Vuren
Represented By: Stacey Anne Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Carol Szurkowski
Represented By: Robert D. Wick
Represented By: Claire Catalano Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Carol Szurkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Securities USA Inc.
Represented By: Jerome Steven Fortinsky
Represented By: Stuart Jay Baskin
Represented By: Joanna Shally
Represented By: H. Miriam Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dealerweb Inc
Represented By: Jon Randall Roellke
Represented By: Anthony R. Van Vuren
Represented By: Stacey Anne Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Toby E Futter
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Robert White Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: University of Puerto Rico Retirement System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Bank of America Corp.
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: John Doe Defendants Nos. 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?