In Re: Lyondell Chemical Company
Defendant: Lyondell Chemical Company and Sanford S. Wadler
Appellee: F/A/O FNY SEC/HLW Group, Ohio Carpenters MidCap, Farallon Capital, Prime Broker 1, Individual 24, Fund 8, LP MA1 Ltd. (LATIGO ULTRA FUND LTD.), Sovereign Fund 1, IRA FBO, Janet F. Ross VFTC, Fifth Third Bank, James Floyd Bisset Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory, Robert H Kramer & Halina J Kramer TEN ENT WROS, Individual 16, Mutual Fund 28, Mutual Fund 27, John M Fox & Marcella F Fox JT Ten, State Teachers Retirement System, International Brokerage Retail Equity, Dudley C. Mecum, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 2, Individual 23, Fund 33, Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II, Diane L. Abbey, Vincent De Cicco, Financial Advisor 6, Pension Fund 4, William J Hughes Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory, Touradji Diversified Master Fund Ltd., Pedro Alberto Garza Cantu & E Villarreal de Garza Jt Ten, Individual 26, Doft & Co., Inc. Firm Account, Wengln Partners LP, Robert T Williamson Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Rollover, Trust 11, Mutual Fund 22, Ann Hinchliffe, Individual 6, Financial Advisor 3, Fund 19, Institutional Benchmarks C/O Lyra Capital LLC, BellSouth Healthcare S&P 400 A/K/A BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust-Retirees, Li Chen & Andre Scharkowski, Sano Investments LLC, Michael Jarrett IRA, William J. Harkinson & Sarah A Harkinson Ten/Com, Mike Mehmet Mustafoglu Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory, Matthew J. Anderson, Harvest Offshore Investors, Fund 22, Trust 8, Individual 20, Trust 2, Mutual Fund 24, Fund 2, Jennie Anne Balcuns and Donald M Balcuns, Coastview Equity Partners, Individual 2, Alfred R Hoffmann Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory, Equity Overlay Fund LLC, Gulfstream Marketing Inc., Amber Master Fund (Cayman), Timber Hill LLC, Mutual Fund 7, Individual 17, Fund 12, David S Macallaster Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory, Rickert C. Henriksen and Zheyla M. Henriksen Community Property, Arbor Place Limited Partnership, Fund 20, Mutual Fund 5, Individual 22, PSAM World Arbritrage Master Fund Ltd., Stanley Frommer Roslind Frommer Jt Ten, Individual 13, RBC Dominion Securities, BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust- Retirees, Sanford Saul Wadler, Kermit R. Meade, Lampost Blue Chip Fund LP, Broker-Dealer 2, Laura N. Tucker, VTrader Pro, LLC, Mutual Fund 1, Individual 11, James Siegel, Douglas Light & Judith Light Trustees of the Douglas M. & Judith A. Light Rev U/A Dated, Bank 5, Fund 26, Thomas Martin O'Malley, Harold S. Hook, Trust 3, Trust 6, Fund 6, Kirk E Heyne & Karen A Twitchell Ten/Com, Mutual Fund 6, Davenport Private Capital LLC, Fund 3, Timothy Ord & Mary B Ord Jt Ten, Farallon Capital Partners, HBK Master Fund L.P., Fund 13, Mutual Fund 3, Bernard v Fultz Trustee U/W Anderson B Kibble, Corporation 5, Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, Dolphin Ltd. Partnership I, Individual 3, Pension Fund 6, Ohio Carpenters, Track Data Corporation, Fund 24, Stephen HInchliffe, Family Foundation 2, Peter Randall Zierhut Gayle M Zierhut Jt Ten, HTB Investments LLC, First New York Securities LLC, David S Owens & Julie Ann Owens Jt Ten, Fund 23, Sacramento Employees Retirement System Russell, Financial Advisor 4, KDC Merger Arbitrage Fund, LP, Crawford Company LLC (Kiastone Holdings Ltd.), Broker-Dealer 3, Fund 1, Maryl I Ebrite Trustee Maryl I W Ebrite Revocable Trust U/A Dated, Shaun Bridgmohan, Trust 1, Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, ZLP Master Opportunity Fund Ltd., Fund 11, Skylands Special Investment LLC, Neil T Eigen & Patricia S Eigen Jt Ten, Individual 8, Trust 10, Mutual Fund 20, Broker-Dealer 1, Bank 1, Trust 5, Comm. Bank of Kansas, Fund 5, Rockbay Capital Institutional, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 7, Alpine Associates, Sumitomo Trust & Banking, Bank 4, Harvest Capital LP, Garth Heitshusen, Individual 19, Fund 21, Michael Edward Dokupil, Kevin D. Johnson, Fund 7, Individual 12, Individual 4, Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc. f/k/a Calyon Securities (USA) Inc., Fund 34, Partners Group Alternative Strategies, New Americans LLC, Thomas Gwinford Barton Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Rollover, Masons Pen Sierra/Glenmede, Doft and Co., Inc., Family Foundation 1, Insured Index Plus Trust, Bank 3, Mutual Fund 2, Accounting Firm 1, Neil T Eigen Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Rollover, Fund 28, Corporation 6, Denis Patrick Kelleher, Esq. PLLC, Trust 12, Tom C Evans Charles Schwab & Co Inc cust Roth Conversion IRA, M Hakan & R Salkin Trustees of the Michael J. Hakan Charitable Re U/A Dated, Wabash Harvest Partners LP, Mutual Fund 26, Fund 27, Trust 9, Vicki M Wadler Living Trust UAD Vicki M Wadler Trustee, Fund 10, Merebis Master Fund Limited, Corporation 44, Geza Szayer Paulette Szayer, Fund 36, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 12, Robert Emery & Dana Emery, Trustees of the Robert L & Dana M Emery Family U/A Dated, Bellsouth Group Life Trust - S& A/K/A Bellsouth Corporation RFA Veba Trust, Hillary L. Shane, Family Foundation 3, Pension Fund 2, Affiliate of Corporation 1, Sandra A Smith Ten/Com, NBCN, Inc., Elisabeth H. Doft, Individual 9, Corporation 4, Fund 9, Palomino Fund Ltd., Pension Fund 1, Pension Fund 5, Virginia L. Lyon, Fund 25, Redbourn Partners Ltd., Mutual Fund 21, Touradji Global Resources Master Fund, Ltd., Rockbay Capital Fund LLC, OP&F / Intech, Rockbay Capital Offshore Fund, Litespeed Master Fund Ltd., First NY Securities / Britally Capital A/K/A First New York Securities, LLC, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 3, Financial Advisor 5, Fursa Master Global Event Driven Fund LP, Fund 30, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 10, Fund 29, David Leshner, Fishbein Advisory Co., Cato Enterprises LLC Arbitrage Account, Individual 25, Fund 35, Corporation 2, Jack H Cain & Esther Cain Trustee Cain Trust U/A Dated, Working Womans Home Association, Individual 5, Louis S Rouse & Mary A Rouse, Pension Fund 3, Yield Strategies Fund II, LP, Harvest Master Enhanced Limited, Financial Advisor 2, Fund 4, Mutual Fund 25, Mutual Fund 12, Plasma Physics Corp., Tinicum Partners, L.P., Fund 14, Jack H Cain Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Rollover, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 1, Fund 32, Primevest Financial Services, Glazer Offshore Fund Ltd., Individual 15, Individual 27, Rangeley Capital Partners LP, Mutual Fund 29, Mary B Ord UTA Charles Schwab & Co Inc IRA Contributory Dated, PSAM Europe Master Fund, Ltd., Masons Annuity Sierra/Glenmede, John Deere Pension Trust, BellSouth Corporation RFA VEBA Trust, Harvest AA Capital LP, Donald M Balcuns Living Trust Donald M Balcuns and Jennie Anne Balcuns, Gabelli Associates, Mutual Fund 10, Fund 18, Individual 14, BACAP Equity Fund XXI, MJR Partners, Timothy Ord UTA Charles Schwab & Co Inc IRA Contributory Dated, Trust 17, NBCN Inc., Mutual Fund 23, Noonday Capital Partners LLC, Timothy Ord UTA Charles Schwab & Co Inc IRA Rollover Dated, SERS/SSGA Pass, M Nisita & L Nisita Trustee Maurizio Nisita Revocable Trust U/A Dated, Joseph DiBenedetto Jr Trustee of the Joseph DiBenedetto Jr MD Inc Def Cont U/A Dated Account 1, Corporation 1, Individual 21, Fund 31, Arthur and Nancy Lee, Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, L.P., Alpine associates, a limited partnership, Farallon Capital Partners, L.P. and Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, L.P.
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Taliesin Capital Partners LP
Appellant: Edward S. Weisfelner
Interested Party: Pension Fund 21
Case Number: 1:2016cv00518
Filed: January 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 OPINION & ORDER # 106834 re: #75 MOTION for Joinder . filed by William J Hughes Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory, Individual 27, Alfred R Hoffmann Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory, James Floyd Bisset Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory, Timothy Ord UTA Charles Schwab & Co Inc IRA Contributory Dated 10/04/91, Trust 9, Timothy Ord UTA Charles Schwab & Co Inc IRA Rollover Dated 01/14/97, Robert Emery & Dana Emery, Trustees of the Robert L & Dana M Emery Family U/A Dated 06/22/1998, Lampost Blue Chip Fund LP, Kermit R. Meade, Michael Jarrett IRA, Timothy Ord & Mary B Ord Jt Ten, Thomas Gwinford Barton Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Rollover, Joseph DiBenedetto Jr Trustee of the Joseph DiBenedetto Jr MD Inc Def Cont U/A Dated 10/01/84 Account 1, Mary B Ord UTA Charles Schwab & Co Inc IRA Contributory Dated 10/06/91, #72 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #71 Memorandum & Opinion, . filed by Bank 5, Fund 6, MJR Partners, Fund 14, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 3, NBCN, Inc., Fund 11, Fund 5, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 10, Corporation 6, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 2, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 7, Fund 7, Bank 4, Fund 10, Bank 3, Elisabeth H. Doft, Fund 8, BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust- Retirees, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 1, HBK Master Fund L.P., BellSouth Corporation RFA VEBA Trust, Doft and Co., Inc., Affiliate of Mutual Fund 12, Fund 13, Fund 9, Fund 12, Corporation 5, RBC Dominion Securities, Affiliate of Corporation 1. The Shareholder Defendants' August 10, 2016 motions for reconsideration and certification are denied. This case is remanded for further proceedings. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/5/2016) (cf)
September 9, 2016 Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #72 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #71 Memorandum & Opinion, . . Document filed by Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 1, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 2, Affiliate of Corporation 1, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 10, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 12, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 7, Bank 3, Bank 4, Bank 5, BellSouth Corporation RFA VEBA Trust, BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust- Retirees, Corporation 5, Corporation 6, Elisabeth H. Doft, Doft and Co., Inc., Fund 10, Fund 11, Fund 12, Fund 13, Fund 14, Fund 5, Fund 6, Fund 7, Fund 8, Fund 9, HBK Master Fund L.P., MJR Partners, NBCN, Inc., RBC Dominion Securities. (Anker, Philip)
August 26, 2016 Filing 94 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Shareholder Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, or in the Alternative for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) served on Parties listed in Schedules A and B on 08/26/2016. Service was made by Mail and E-Mail. Document filed by Edward S. Weisfelner. (Wissner-Gross, Sigmund)
August 26, 2016 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #72 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #71 Memorandum & Opinion, . . Document filed by Edward S. Weisfelner. (Wissner-Gross, Sigmund)
August 24, 2016 Filing 92 JOINDER to join re: #71 Memorandum & Opinion, #73 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, #72 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #71 Memorandum & Opinion, . . Document filed by Trust 17.(Bronheim, Elizabeth)
August 24, 2016 Filing 91 JOINDER to join re: #71 Memorandum & Opinion, #73 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, #72 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #71 Memorandum & Opinion, . . Document filed by Corporation 44.(Bronheim, Elizabeth)
August 24, 2016 Filing 90 JOINDER to join re: #71 Memorandum & Opinion, #73 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, #72 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #71 Memorandum & Opinion, . . Document filed by Sano Investments LLC.(Rossan, Jennifer)
August 23, 2016 Filing 89 JOINDER to join re: #73 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, #72 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #71 Memorandum & Opinion, . of ZLP Master Opportunity Fund, Ltd. in the Shareholder Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, or in the Alternative for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). Document filed by ZLP Master Opportunity Fund Ltd..(Koerner, Scott)
August 23, 2016 Filing 88 JOINDER to join Joinder to Shareholder Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, or in the Alternative for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). Document filed by OP&F / Intech, Pension Fund 1, Pension Fund 2.(Swetnam, Daniel)
August 23, 2016 Filing 87 JOINDER to join re: #71 Memorandum & Opinion, #73 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, #72 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #71 Memorandum & Opinion, . . Document filed by Arthur and Nancy Lee, Virginia L. Lyon.(Bartkus, Robert)
August 23, 2016 Filing 86 JOINDER to join re: #73 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, #72 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #71 Memorandum & Opinion, . of the Shareholder Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, Or in the Alternative, for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). Document filed by Cato Enterprises LLC Arbitrage Account.(Hilliard, Craig)
August 23, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Craig Scott Hilliard to RE-FILE Document #85 MOTION for Joinder to the Shareholder Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, Or in the Alternative, for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). Use the event type Joinder found under the event list Other Documents. (db)
August 23, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jonathan David Forstot to RE-FILE Document #83 MOTION for Joinder of ZLP Master Opportunity Fund, Ltd. in the Shareholder Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, or in the Alternative for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). Use the event type Joinder found under the event list Other Documents. (db)
August 23, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Paulina Stamatelos to RE-FILE Document #82 MOTION for Joinder Joinder to Shareholder Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, Or in the Alternative for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b).. Use the event type Joinder found under the event list Other Documents. (db)
August 23, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Daniel R. Swetnam to RE-FILE Document #79 MOTION for Joinder Joinder to Shareholder Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, Or in the Alternative for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). Use the event type Joinder found under the event list Other Documents. (db)
August 23, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jennifer Amy Rossan to RE-FILE Document #77 MOTION for Joinder . Use the event type Joinder found under the event list Other Documents. (db)
August 23, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Robert E. Bartkus to RE-FILE Document #76 MOTION for Joinder . Use the event type Joinder found under the event list Other Documents. (db)
August 19, 2016 Filing 85 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Joinder to the Shareholder Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, Or in the Alternative, for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). Document filed by Cato Enterprises LLC Arbitrage Account.(Hilliard, Craig) Modified on 8/23/2016 (db).
August 12, 2016 Filing 84 JOINDER to join re: #73 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, #72 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #71 Memorandum & Opinion, . (Shareholder Defendants Motion for Reconsideration, or in the Alternative for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) ). Document filed by Bank 3, Pension Fund 21.(Etkin, Michael)
August 11, 2016 Filing 83 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Joinder of ZLP Master Opportunity Fund, Ltd. in the Shareholder Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, or in the Alternative for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). Document filed by ZLP Master Opportunity Fund Ltd..(Forstot, Jonathan) Modified on 8/23/2016 (db).
August 11, 2016 Filing 82 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Joinder Joinder to Shareholder Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, Or in the Alternative for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b).. Document filed by Pension Fund 6.(Stamatelos, Paulina) Modified on 8/23/2016 (db).
August 11, 2016 Filing 81 JOINDER to join re: #73 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, #72 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #71 Memorandum & Opinion, . . Document filed by Neil T Eigen & Patricia S Eigen Jt Ten, Neil T Eigen Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Rollover.(Glas, Eduardo)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 SCHEDULING ORDER: SCHEDULING ORDER: On August 10, 2016, certain Shareholder Defendants filed a motion for reconsideration or leave to file an interlocutory appeal of the Courts July 27, 2016 Opinion and Order. Other defendants have joined the motion. It is hereby ORDERED that the Trustees opposition is due August 26. The Shareholder Defendants reply is due September 9..... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/11/2016) (gr)
August 11, 2016 Filing 79 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Joinder Joinder to Shareholder Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, Or in the Alternative for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). Document filed by OP&F / Intech, Pension Fund 1, Pension Fund 2.(Swetnam, Daniel) Modified on 8/23/2016 (db).
August 11, 2016 Filing 78 JOINDER to join re: #73 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, #72 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #71 Memorandum & Opinion, . . Document filed by Sanford S. Wadler.(Christmas, Robert)
August 11, 2016 Filing 77 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Joinder . Document filed by Sano Investments LLC.(Rossan, Jennifer) Modified on 8/23/2016 (db).
August 10, 2016 Filing 76 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Joinder . Document filed by Arthur and Nancy Lee, Virginia L. Lyon.(Bartkus, Robert) Modified on 8/23/2016 (db).
August 10, 2016 Filing 75 MOTION for Joinder . Document filed by Alfred R Hoffmann Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory, Individual 27, James Floyd Bisset Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory, Joseph DiBenedetto Jr Trustee of the Joseph DiBenedetto Jr MD Inc Def Cont U/A Dated 10/01/84 Account 1, Lampost Blue Chip Fund LP, Mary B Ord UTA Charles Schwab & Co Inc IRA Contributory Dated 10/06/91, Kermit R. Meade, Michael Jarrett IRA, Robert Emery & Dana Emery, Trustees of the Robert L & Dana M Emery Family U/A Dated 06/22/1998, Thomas Gwinford Barton Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Rollover, Timothy Ord & Mary B Ord Jt Ten, Timothy Ord UTA Charles Schwab & Co Inc IRA Contributory Dated 10/04/91, Timothy Ord UTA Charles Schwab & Co Inc IRA Rollover Dated 01/14/97, Trust 9, William J Hughes Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory.(Grannum, Sandra)
August 10, 2016 Filing 74 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Patrick N. Petrocelli dated August 10, 2016 re: Defendant Sacramento County Employees' Retirement System Joining in Shareholder Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, or in the Alternative, for Certification. Document filed by Sacramento Employees Retirement System Russell.(Petrocelli, Patrick)
August 10, 2016 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #72 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #71 Memorandum & Opinion, . . Document filed by Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 1, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 2, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 3, Affiliate of Corporation 1, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 10, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 12, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 7, Bank 3, Bank 4, Bank 5, BellSouth Corporation RFA VEBA Trust, BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust- Retirees, Corporation 5, Corporation 6, Elisabeth H. Doft, Doft and Co., Inc., Fund 10, Fund 11, Fund 12, Fund 13, Fund 14, Fund 5, Fund 6, Fund 7, Fund 8, Fund 9, HBK Master Fund L.P., MJR Partners, NBCN, Inc., RBC Dominion Securities. (Anker, Philip)
August 10, 2016 Filing 72 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #71 Memorandum & Opinion, . Document filed by Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 1, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 2, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 3, Affiliate of Corporation 1, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 10, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 12, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 7, Bank 3, Bank 4, Bank 5, BellSouth Corporation RFA VEBA Trust, BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust- Retirees, Corporation 5, Corporation 6, Elisabeth H. Doft, Doft and Co., Inc., Fund 10, Fund 11, Fund 12, Fund 13, Fund 14, Fund 5, Fund 6, Fund 7, Fund 8, Fund 9, HBK Master Fund L.P., MJR Partners, NBCN, Inc., RBC Dominion Securities.(Anker, Philip)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OPINION & ORDER #106589.....The Bankruptcy Courts November 18, 2015 decision is reversed. The intentional fraudulent conveyance claim is reinstated. This case is remanded for further proceedings. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/27/2016) (gr) Modified on 7/28/2016 (ca).
June 30, 2016 Filing 70 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philip D. Anker dated 6/30/2016 re: in Response to Plaintiff-Appellants June 24 Letter. Document filed by Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 1, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 2, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 3, Affiliate of Corporation 1, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 10, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 12, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 7, Bank 3, Bank 4, Bank 5, BellSouth Corporation RFA VEBA Trust, BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust- Retirees, Corporation 5, Corporation 6, Elisabeth H. Doft, Doft and Co., Inc., Fund 10, Fund 11, Fund 12, Fund 13, Fund 14, Fund 5, Fund 6, Fund 7, Fund 8, Fund 9, HBK Master Fund L.P., MJR Partners, NBCN, Inc., RBC Dominion Securities.(Anker, Philip)
June 29, 2016 Filing 69 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Letter addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Sigmund S. Wissner-Gross, Esq. dated June 24, 2016 re: supplemental authority served on Parties listed in Schedules A and B on 6/24/2016; 6/27/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Edward S. Weisfelner. (Wissner-Gross, Sigmund)
June 24, 2016 Filing 68 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Sigmund S. Wissner-Gross dated June 24, 2016 re: supplemental authority pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8014(f). Document filed by Edward S. Weisfelner. (Attachments: #1 Enclosure)(Wissner-Gross, Sigmund)
May 6, 2016 Filing 67 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting withdrawal of Jessica Wheeler as Counsel of Record for Appellees..... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/6/2016) (gr)
May 6, 2016 Filing 66 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
May 3, 2016 Filing 65 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Reply Brief of Plaintiff-Appellant Edward S. Weisfelner, As Litigation Trustee of the LB Litigation Trust served on Parties listed in Schedules A and B on 4/29/2016; 5/2/2016. Service was made by Mail and Email. Document filed by Edward S. Weisfelner. (Wissner-Gross, Sigmund)
April 29, 2016 Filing 64 Appellant's REPLY BRIEF. Document filed by Edward S. Weisfelner. (Wissner-Gross, Sigmund)
April 20, 2016 Filing 63 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from May Orenstein dated April 14, 2016 re: advising of submission of Stipulation extending deadline for Trustee to file and serve a reply brief from April 22, 2016 to April 29, 2016. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Reply is due 4/29. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/20/2016) (gr)
April 14, 2016 Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from May Orenstein dated April 14, 2016 re: advising of submission of Stipulation extending deadline for Trustee to file and serve a reply brief from April 22, 2016 to April 29, 2016. Document filed by Edward S. Weisfelner.(Orenstein, May)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER APPROVING NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF JEREMY S. WINER AS COUNSEL OF RECORD (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/6/2016) (gr)
April 4, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure. Document filed by Family Foundation 2, Farallon Capital, Individual 19, Individual 26, Individual 3, Individual 4, Litespeed Master Fund Ltd., Noonday Capital Partners LLC, Tinicum Partners, L.P., Trust 10, Trust 11, Trust 5, Trust 8. (Gold, Matthew)
April 4, 2016 Filing 59 Appellee's BRIEF. Document filed by Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 1, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 2, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 3, Affiliate of Corporation 1, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 10, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 12, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 7, Bank 3, Bank 4, Bank 5, BellSouth Corporation RFA VEBA Trust, BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust- Retirees, Corporation 5, Corporation 6, Elisabeth H. Doft, Doft and Co., Inc., Fund 10, Fund 11, Fund 12, Fund 13, Fund 14, Fund 5, Fund 6, Fund 7, Fund 8, Fund 9, HBK Master Fund L.P., MJR Partners, NBCN, Inc., RBC Dominion Securities. Appellant Reply Brief due by 4/18/2016. (Anker, Philip)
April 4, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Zachary Goldman on behalf of KDC Merger Arbitrage Fund, LP, Timber Hill LLC. (Goldman, Daniel)
April 1, 2016 Filing 57 DECLARATION of May Orenstein re: #50 Endorsed Letter, . Document filed by Edward S. Weisfelner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (Part 1 of 2), #3 Exhibit 2 (Part 2 of 2), #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Orenstein, May)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW THEREFORE, the Court orders: 1. Certain counsel, including the undersigned defense counsel, that represent some of the larger Defendants-Appellees shall work in good faith to file a single Defendants-Appellees' brief on or before April 4, 2016 and shall, before doing so, share a draft of the brief with all other defense counsel that have entered an appearance; 2. The Defendants-Appellees' brief shall be deemed filed on behalf of all Defendants-Appellees and no other Defendant-Appellee need file its own brief or a joinder to the Defendants-Appellees' brief unless such other Defendant-Appellee believes that the Defendants-Appellees' brief does not adequately set forth the arguments it wishes to make in this appeal. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Appellee Brief due by 4/4/2016.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/1/2016) (cf)
March 28, 2016 Filing 55 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alana Mary Longmoore on behalf of Pension Fund 3. (Longmoore, Alana) Modified on 5/27/2016 (kj).
March 28, 2016 Filing 54 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard C. Pepperman, II on behalf of Pension Fund 3. (Pepperman, Richard) Modified on 5/27/2016 (kj).
March 28, 2016 Filing 53 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Edward Clark on behalf of Pension Fund 3. (Clark, Bruce) Modified on 5/27/2016 (kj).
March 23, 2016 Filing 52 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/10/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 23, 2016 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/10/2016 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 22, 2016 Filing 50 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philip D. Anker dated 3/21/2016 re: Status of the Parties' Efforts to Avoid Filing Any Part of the Record on Appeal Under Seal. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/22/2016) (gr)
March 21, 2016 Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from May Orenstein dated March 21, 2016 re: Joinder to March 21, 2016 Letter filed by WilmerHale in accordance with the Court's directions and March 15, 2016 Order. Document filed by Edward S. Weisfelner.(Orenstein, May)
March 21, 2016 Filing 48 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philip D. Anker dated 3/21/2016 re: Status of the Parties' Efforts to Avoid Filing Any Part of the Record on Appeal Under Seal. Document filed by Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 1, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 2, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 3, Affiliate of Corporation 1, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 10, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 12, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 7, Bank 3, Bank 4, Bank 5, BellSouth Corporation RFA VEBA Trust, BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust- Retirees, Corporation 5, Corporation 6, Elisabeth H. Doft, Doft and Co., Inc., Fund 10, Fund 11, Fund 12, Fund 13, Fund 14, Fund 5, Fund 6, Fund 7, Fund 8, Fund 9, HBK Master Fund L.P., MJR Partners, NBCN, Inc., RBC Dominion Securities.(Anker, Philip)
March 16, 2016 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dianne Frances Coffino on behalf of Taliesin Capital Partners LP. (Coffino, Dianne)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Pursuant to the teleconference held on March 10, 2016, it was ORDERED that the parties withdraw by March 14 any materials unnecessary to the pursuit or defense of this appeal. IT WAS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties promptly advise any interested third parties who may seek redactions to remaining materials in the record that they must file a letter by March 18 explaining the basis for any redactions they seek. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a status letter by March 21 regarding their compliance with this Order. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/15/2016) (gr)
March 11, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Nicholas Petrocelli on behalf of Sacramento Employees Retirement System Russell. (Petrocelli, Patrick)
March 9, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn Anne Coleman on behalf of Family Foundation 2, Individual 13, Individual 17, Individual 19, Individual 20, Individual 21, Individual 22, Individual 23, Individual 25, Individual 3, Individual 6, Individual 8, Individual 9. (Coleman, Kathryn)
March 9, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Charles Gartman on behalf of Family Foundation 2, Individual 13, Individual 17, Individual 19, Individual 20, Individual 21, Individual 22, Individual 23, Individual 25, Individual 3, Individual 6, Individual 8, Individual 9. (Gartman, Christopher)
March 8, 2016 Filing 42 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: On March 3, 2016 the appellant filed a motion for an order accepting under seal certain documents that were placed under seal by the Bankruptcy Court in the adversary proceeding below. Accordingly, it is herebyORDERED that the Court will hold a teleconference with the parties regarding this motion on Thursday, March 10 at 3:30pm. The appellant shall provide notice of the teleconference to any third parties that may wish to participate. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/8/2016) (gr)
March 7, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce I. Goldstein on behalf of Arthur and Nancy Lee. (Goldstein, Bruce)
March 7, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert E. Bartkus on behalf of Virginia L. Lyon. New Address: McCusker Anselmi Rosen & Carvelli PC, 210 Park Avenue, Suite 301, Florham Park, NJ, USA 07932, 973-635-6300. (Bartkus, Robert)
March 7, 2016 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Opening Brief of Plaintiff-Appellant Edward S. Weisfelner, as Litigation Trustee of the LB Litigation Trust served on Parties listed in Schedules A and B on 3/3/2016; 3/4/2016. Service was made by Mail and Email. Document filed by Edward S. Weisfelner. (Wissner-Gross, Sigmund)
March 7, 2016 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of (1) Notice of Motion of Edward S. Weisfelner, as Litigation Trustee of the LB Litigation Trust for an Order Accepting Under Seal Certain Documents Designated for Inclusion in the Record on Appeal, (2) Memorandum of Law in Support of the Motion of Edward S. Weisfelner, as Litigation Trustee of the LB Litigation Trust for an Order Accepting Under Seal Certain Documents Designated for Inclusion in the Record on Appeal, with Exhibit A thereto and (3) Declaration of Sigmund S. Wissner-Gross dated March 2, 2016, with Exhibits A and B thereto served on Parties listed in Schedules A and B on 3/2/2016. Service was made by Mail and Email. Document filed by Edward S. Weisfelner. (Wissner-Gross, Sigmund)
March 4, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert E. Bartkus on behalf of Virginia L. Lyon. (Bartkus, Robert)
March 4, 2016 Filing 35 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Sigmund S. Wissner-Gross dated March 2, 2016 re: requesting permission to file affidavits of service under seal. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/4/2016) (gr)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Robert Alan Koenig to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (Cote, Denise)
March 3, 2016 Filing 33 Appellant's BRIEF. Document filed by Edward S. Weisfelner. Appellee Brief due by 4/4/2016. (Wissner-Gross, Sigmund)
March 2, 2016 Filing 32 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Sigmund S. Wissner-Gross dated March 2, 2016 re: requesting permission to file affidavits of service under seal. Document filed by Edward S. Weisfelner.(Wissner-Gross, Sigmund)
March 2, 2016 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Sigmund S. Wissner-Gross in Support re: #29 MOTION to Seal /Notice of Motion of Edward S. Weisfelner, as Litigation Trustee of the LB Litigation Trust for an Order Accepting Under Seal Certain Documents Designated for Inclusion in the Record on Appeal.. Document filed by Edward S. Weisfelner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wissner-Gross, Sigmund)
March 2, 2016 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 MOTION to Seal /Notice of Motion of Edward S. Weisfelner, as Litigation Trustee of the LB Litigation Trust for an Order Accepting Under Seal Certain Documents Designated for Inclusion in the Record on Appeal. . Document filed by Edward S. Weisfelner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Wissner-Gross, Sigmund)
March 2, 2016 Filing 29 MOTION to Seal /Notice of Motion of Edward S. Weisfelner, as Litigation Trustee of the LB Litigation Trust for an Order Accepting Under Seal Certain Documents Designated for Inclusion in the Record on Appeal. Document filed by Edward S. Weisfelner.(Wissner-Gross, Sigmund)
March 1, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #28 MOTION for Robert Alan Koenig to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12013025. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 1, 2016 Filing 28 MOTION for Robert Alan Koenig to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12013025. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ohio Carpenters MidCap. (Attachments: #1 Supreme Ct of Ohio Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Koenig, Robert)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Jacqueline K. Matthews to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (Cote, Denise)
February 23, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #26 MOTION for Jacqueline K. Matthews to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 23, 2016 Filing 26 MOTION for Jacqueline K. Matthews to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Financial Advisor 3. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Matthews, Jacqueline)
February 23, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #24 MOTION for Jacqueline K. Matthews to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11985068. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #25 MOTION for Anthony M. Sharett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11985205. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): There should only be one case caption and case number on the motion and proposed order.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
February 23, 2016 Filing 25 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Anthony M. Sharett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11985205. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Financial Advisor 3. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sharett, Anthony) Modified on 2/23/2016 (bcu).
February 23, 2016 Filing 24 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jacqueline K. Matthews to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11985068. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Financial Advisor 3. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Matthews, Jacqueline) Modified on 2/23/2016 (bcu).
February 17, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John F. Higgins on behalf of HTB Investments LLC, Harold S. Hook, Kirk E Heyne & Karen A Twitchell Ten/Com, Sandra A Smith Ten/Com, William J. Harkinson & Sarah A Harkinson Ten/Com, Coastview Equity Partners, Garth Heitshusen, Stephen HInchliffe, Ann Hinchliffe. (Higgins, John)
February 11, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David A. Pisciotta on behalf of ZLP Master Opportunity Fund Ltd.. New Address: Troutman Sanders LLP, 875 Third Avenue, New York, New York, 10022, (212) 704-6000. (Pisciotta, David)
February 11, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel R. Swetnam on behalf of OP&F / Intech, Pension Fund 1, Pension Fund 2. (Swetnam, Daniel)
February 10, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ari Joseph Savitzky on behalf of Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 1, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 2, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 3, Affiliate of Corporation 1, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 10, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 12, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 7, Bank 3, Bank 4, Bank 5, BellSouth Corporation RFA VEBA Trust, BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust- Retirees, Corporation 5, Corporation 6, Elisabeth H. Doft, Doft and Co., Inc., Fund 10, Fund 11, Fund 12, Fund 13, Fund 14, Fund 5, Fund 6, Fund 7, Fund 8, Fund 9, HBK Master Fund L.P., MJR Partners, NBCN, Inc., RBC Dominion Securities. (Savitzky, Ari)
February 10, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael A Guippone on behalf of Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 1, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 2, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 3, Affiliate of Corporation 1, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 10, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 12, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 7, Bank 3, Bank 4, Bank 5, BellSouth Corporation RFA VEBA Trust, BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust- Retirees, Corporation 5, Corporation 6, Elisabeth H. Doft, Doft and Co., Inc., Fund 10, Fund 11, Fund 12, Fund 13, Fund 14, Fund 5, Fund 6, Fund 7, Fund 8, Fund 9, HBK Master Fund L.P., MJR Partners, NBCN, Inc., RBC Dominion Securities. (Guippone, Michael)
February 10, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Easton Glantz on behalf of Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 1, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 2, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 3, Affiliate of Corporation 1, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 10, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 12, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 7, Bank 3, Bank 4, Bank 5, BellSouth Corporation RFA VEBA Trust, BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust- Retirees, Corporation 5, Corporation 6, Elisabeth H. Doft, Doft and Co., Inc., Fund 10, Fund 11, Fund 12, Fund 13, Fund 14, Fund 5, Fund 6, Fund 7, Fund 8, Fund 9, HBK Master Fund L.P., MJR Partners, NBCN, Inc., RBC Dominion Securities. (Glantz, Andrew)
February 10, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hanna A. Baek on behalf of Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 1, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 2, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 3, Affiliate of Corporation 1, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 10, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 12, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 7, Bank 3, Bank 4, Bank 5, BellSouth Corporation RFA VEBA Trust, BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust- Retirees, Corporation 5, Corporation 6, Elisabeth H. Doft, Doft and Co., Inc., Fund 10, Fund 11, Fund 12, Fund 13, Fund 14, Fund 5, Fund 6, Fund 7, Fund 8, Fund 9, HBK Master Fund L.P., MJR Partners, NBCN, Inc., RBC Dominion Securities. (Baek, Hanna)
February 10, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Wheeler on behalf of Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 1, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 2, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 3, Affiliate of Corporation 1, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 10, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 12, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 7, Bank 3, Bank 4, Bank 5, BellSouth Corporation RFA VEBA Trust, BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust- Retirees, Corporation 5, Corporation 6, Elisabeth H. Doft, Doft and Co., Inc., Fund 10, Fund 11, Fund 12, Fund 13, Fund 14, Fund 5, Fund 6, Fund 7, Fund 8, Fund 9, HBK Master Fund L.P., MJR Partners, NBCN, Inc., RBC Dominion Securities. (Wheeler, Jessica)
February 10, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ross Eric Firsenbaum on behalf of Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 1, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 2, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 3, Affiliate of Corporation 1, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 10, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 12, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 7, Bank 3, Bank 4, Bank 5, BellSouth Corporation RFA VEBA Trust, BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust- Retirees, Corporation 5, Corporation 6, Elisabeth H. Doft, Doft and Co., Inc., Fund 10, Fund 11, Fund 12, Fund 13, Fund 14, Fund 5, Fund 6, Fund 7, Fund 8, Fund 9, HBK Master Fund L.P., MJR Partners, NBCN, Inc., RBC Dominion Securities. (Firsenbaum, Ross)
February 10, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip David Anker on behalf of Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 1, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 2, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 3, Affiliate of Corporation 1, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 10, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 12, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 7, Bank 3, Bank 4, Bank 5, BellSouth Corporation RFA VEBA Trust, BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust- Retirees, Corporation 5, Corporation 6, Elisabeth H. Doft, Doft and Co., Inc., Fund 10, Fund 11, Fund 12, Fund 13, Fund 14, Fund 5, Fund 6, Fund 7, Fund 8, Fund 9, HBK Master Fund L.P., MJR Partners, NBCN, Inc., RBC Dominion Securities. (Anker, Philip)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Daniel R. Swetnam to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (Cote, Denise)
February 10, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by William A. Rome on behalf of Arbor Place Limited Partnership, Geza Szayer Paulette Szayer, M Hakan & R Salkin Trustees of the Michael J. Hakan Charitable Re U/A Dated 12/20/1995, Peter Randall Zierhut Gayle M Zierhut Jt Ten. New Address: Robinson Brog Leinwand Greene Genovese & Gluck PC, 875 Third Avenue, 9th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10022, 212-603-6300. (Rome, William)
February 10, 2016 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME....The deadline for the Trustee to serve and file an opening brief is extended to and including 3/3/2016. The deadline for the defendants to serve and file an opposition brief is extended to and including 4/4/2016. The deadline for the Trustee to serve and file a reply brief is extended to and including 4/22/2016, (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/10/2016) (gr)
February 9, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Hugh M. McDonald on behalf of ZLP Master Opportunity Fund Ltd.. New Address: Troutman Sanders LLP, 875 Third Avenue, New York, New York, 10022, (212) 704-6000. (McDonald, Hugh)
February 9, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Daniel R. Swetnam to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11935197. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
February 9, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION for Daniel R. Swetnam to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11935197. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by OP&F / Intech, Pension Fund 1, Pension Fund 2. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Swetnam, Daniel)
February 9, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jonathan David Forstot on behalf of ZLP Master Opportunity Fund Ltd.. New Address: Troutman Sanders LLP, 875 Third Avenue, New York, New York, 10022, (212) 704-6000. (Forstot, Jonathan)
February 5, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Kevin Haney on behalf of Financial Advisor 3. (Haney, James)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The above case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is herebyORDERED that the appellant file its brief by February 12, 2016. The appellees shall file their opposition brief by February 26. The appellants reply brief, if any, must be filed by March 11..... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/2/2016) (gr)
January 26, 2016 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. (wb)
January 26, 2016 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 26, 2016 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:11-cv-08251-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 22, 2016 NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL COMPLETION. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. Appellant Brief due by 2/22/2016. (bkar)
January 22, 2016 Filing 5 COUNTER DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Appellees Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 1, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 2, Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 3, Affiliate of Corporation 1, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 10, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 12, Affiliate of Mutual Fund 7, Bank 3, Bank 4, Bank 5, BellSouth Corporation RFA VEBA Trust, BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust- Retirees, Corporation 5, Corporation 6, Elisabeth H. Doft, Doft and Co., Inc., Fund 10, Fund 11, Fund 12, Fund 13, Fund 14, Fund 5, Fund 6, Fund 7, Fund 8, Fund 9, HBK Master Fund L.P., MJR Partners, NBCN, Inc., RBC Dominion Securities. (bkar)
January 22, 2016 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Edward S. Weisfelner. (bkar)
January 22, 2016 Case Designated ECF. (bkar)
January 22, 2016 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 11-cv-8251. Document filed by Edward S. Weisfelner.(bkar)
January 22, 2016 BANKRUPTCY APPEAL CASE REFERRED BY ATTORNEY TO Judge Denise L. Cote as possibly related to 11-cv-8251. (bkar)
January 22, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar)
January 22, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Robert E. Gerber dated December 8, 2015. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-5525A, 09-B-10023 (REG). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Edward S. Weisfelner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Lyondell Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyondell Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanford S. Wadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: F/A/O FNY SEC/HLW Group
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Peter J. Macdonald
Represented By: Jeremy S. Winer
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ohio Carpenters MidCap
Represented By: John Winship Read
Represented By: Robert Alan Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Farallon Capital
Represented By: David Parker
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Prime Broker 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 24
Represented By: Julia V. Smolyanskiy
Represented By: Bonnie K. Steingart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 8
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LP MA1 Ltd. (LATIGO ULTRA FUND LTD.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sovereign Fund 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: IRA FBO, Janet F. Ross VFTC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Conrad K. Chiu
Represented By: Ronald S. Beacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: James Floyd Bisset Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory
Represented By: Sandra Dawn Grannum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Robert H Kramer & Halina J Kramer TEN ENT WROS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 16
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mutual Fund 28
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mutual Fund 27
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John M Fox & Marcella F Fox JT Ten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: State Teachers Retirement System
Represented By: Conrad K. Chiu
Represented By: Ronald S. Beacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: International Brokerage Retail Equity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dudley C. Mecum
Represented By: John F. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 2
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 23
Represented By: Christopher Charles Gartman
Represented By: Julia V. Smolyanskiy
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Coleman
Represented By: Bonnie K. Steingart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 33
Represented By: Stephen Leonard Ratner
Represented By: Harry Frischer
Represented By: David Steve Mordkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II
Represented By: David Parker
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Diane L. Abbey
Represented By: Karin Elizabeth Fisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Vincent De Cicco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Financial Advisor 6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Pension Fund 4
Represented By: Patrick Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: William J Hughes Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory
Represented By: Sandra Dawn Grannum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Touradji Diversified Master Fund Ltd.
Represented By: Ana M. Alfonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Pedro Alberto Garza Cantu & E Villarreal de Garza Jt Ten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 26
Represented By: David Parker
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Doft & Co., Inc. Firm Account
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Peter J. Macdonald
Represented By: Jeremy S. Winer
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wengln Partners LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Robert T Williamson Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Rollover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Trust 11
Represented By: David Parker
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mutual Fund 22
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ann Hinchliffe
Represented By: John F. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 6
Represented By: Christopher Charles Gartman
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Financial Advisor 3
Represented By: Anthony Sharett
Represented By: James Kevin Haney
Represented By: Jacqueline Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 19
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Institutional Benchmarks C/O Lyra Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BellSouth Healthcare S&P 400 A/K/A BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust-Retirees
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Peter J. Macdonald
Represented By: Jeremy S. Winer
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Li Chen & Andre Scharkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sano Investments LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Amy Rossan
Represented By: Douglas R Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael Jarrett IRA
Represented By: Sandra Dawn Grannum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: William J. Harkinson & Sarah A Harkinson Ten/Com
Represented By: John F. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mike Mehmet Mustafoglu Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Matthew J. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Harvest Offshore Investors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 22
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Trust 8
Represented By: David Parker
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 20
Represented By: Christopher Charles Gartman
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Trust 2
Represented By: Julia V. Smolyanskiy
Represented By: Bonnie K. Steingart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mutual Fund 24
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 2
Represented By: John F. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jennie Anne Balcuns and Donald M Balcuns
Represented By: Jonathan S. Pasternak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Coastview Equity Partners
Represented By: John F. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alfred R Hoffmann Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory
Represented By: Sandra Dawn Grannum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Equity Overlay Fund LLC
Represented By: Robert T. Honeywell
Represented By: Richard S. Miller
Represented By: Ryan M. Tosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gulfstream Marketing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Amber Master Fund (Cayman)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Timber Hill LLC
Represented By: Guy Petrillo
Represented By: Daniel Zachary Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mutual Fund 7
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Peter J. Macdonald
Represented By: Jeremy S. Winer
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 17
Represented By: Christopher Charles Gartman
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 12
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: David S Macallaster Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rickert C. Henriksen and Zheyla M. Henriksen Community Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Arbor Place Limited Partnership
Represented By: William A. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mutual Fund 5
Represented By: Alan W. Kornberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 22
Represented By: Christopher Charles Gartman
Represented By: John F. Higgins
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PSAM World Arbritrage Master Fund Ltd.
Represented By: Ana M. Alfonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Stanley Frommer Roslind Frommer Jt Ten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 13
Represented By: Christopher Charles Gartman
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RBC Dominion Securities
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BellSouth Corporation Representable Employees Health Care Trust- Retirees
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sanford Saul Wadler
Represented By: Robert N. H. Christmas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kermit R. Meade
Represented By: Sandra Dawn Grannum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lampost Blue Chip Fund LP
Represented By: Sandra Dawn Grannum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Broker-Dealer 2
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Peter J. Macdonald
Represented By: Jeremy S. Winer
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Laura N. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: VTrader Pro, LLC
Represented By: Richard Milton Asche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mutual Fund 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 11
Represented By: John F. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: James Siegel
Represented By: Jonathan S. Pasternak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Douglas Light & Judith Light Trustees of the Douglas M. & Judith A. Light Rev U/A Dated
Represented By: Bradley S. Defoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank 5
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 26
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Thomas Martin O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Harold S. Hook
Represented By: John F. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Trust 3
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Trust 6
Represented By: Julia V. Smolyanskiy
Represented By: Bonnie K. Steingart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 6
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kirk E Heyne & Karen A Twitchell Ten/Com
Represented By: John F. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mutual Fund 6
Represented By: Alan W. Kornberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Davenport Private Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Timothy Ord & Mary B Ord Jt Ten
Represented By: Sandra Dawn Grannum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Farallon Capital Partners
Represented By: David Parker
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HBK Master Fund L.P.
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 13
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mutual Fund 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bernard v Fultz Trustee U/W Anderson B Kibble
Represented By: Conrad K. Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Corporation 5
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III
Represented By: David Parker
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dolphin Ltd. Partnership I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 3
Represented By: Christopher Charles Gartman
Represented By: David Parker
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Coleman
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Pension Fund 6
Represented By: Paulina Stamatelos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ohio Carpenters
Represented By: John Winship Read
Represented By: Robert Alan Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Track Data Corporation
Represented By: Robert P. Bramnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 24
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Stephen HInchliffe
Represented By: John F. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Family Foundation 2
Represented By: Christopher Charles Gartman
Represented By: David Parker
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Coleman
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Peter Randall Zierhut Gayle M Zierhut Jt Ten
Represented By: William A. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HTB Investments LLC
Represented By: John F. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: First New York Securities LLC
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Peter J. Macdonald
Represented By: Jeremy S. Winer
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: David S Owens & Julie Ann Owens Jt Ten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 23
Represented By: Julia V. Smolyanskiy
Represented By: Bonnie K. Steingart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sacramento Employees Retirement System Russell
Represented By: Patrick Nicholas Petrocelli
Represented By: Melvin Arnold Brosterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Financial Advisor 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KDC Merger Arbitrage Fund, LP
Represented By: Guy Petrillo
Represented By: Daniel Zachary Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Crawford Company LLC (Kiastone Holdings Ltd.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Broker-Dealer 3
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Peter J. Macdonald
Represented By: Jeremy S. Winer
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 1
Represented By: Julia V. Smolyanskiy
Represented By: Bonnie K. Steingart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Maryl I Ebrite Trustee Maryl I W Ebrite Revocable Trust U/A Dated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Shaun Bridgmohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Trust 1
Represented By: Julia V. Smolyanskiy
Represented By: Bonnie K. Steingart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Farallon Capital Institutional Partners
Represented By: David Parker
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ZLP Master Opportunity Fund Ltd.
Represented By: Hugh M. McDonald
Represented By: David A. Pisciotta
Represented By: Jonathan David Forstot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 11
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Skylands Special Investment LLC
Represented By: Robert Anthony Gretch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Neil T Eigen & Patricia S Eigen Jt Ten
Represented By: Eduardo Jorge Glas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 8
Represented By: Christopher Charles Gartman
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Trust 10
Represented By: David Parker
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mutual Fund 20
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Broker-Dealer 1
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Peter J. Macdonald
Represented By: Jeremy S. Winer
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Trust 5
Represented By: David Parker
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Comm. Bank of Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 5
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rockbay Capital Institutional
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Affiliate of Mutual Fund 7
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alpine Associates
Represented By: Norman Arthur Bloch
Represented By: Shaun David McElhenny
Represented By: Jeanette Rodriguez
Represented By: Joseph William Muccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sumitomo Trust & Banking
Represented By: Jordan E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank 4
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Harvest Capital LP
Represented By: Brian Theodore Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Garth Heitshusen
Represented By: John F. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 19
Represented By: Christopher Charles Gartman
Represented By: David Parker
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Coleman
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 21
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael Edward Dokupil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kevin D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 7
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 4
Represented By: David Parker
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc. f/k/a Calyon Securities (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Ana M. Alfonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 34
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Partners Group Alternative Strategies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: New Americans LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Thomas Gwinford Barton Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Rollover
Represented By: Sandra Dawn Grannum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Masons Pen Sierra/Glenmede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Doft and Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Family Foundation 1
Represented By: John F. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Insured Index Plus Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank 3
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mutual Fund 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Accounting Firm 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Neil T Eigen Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Rollover
Represented By: Eduardo Jorge Glas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 28
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Corporation 6
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Denis Patrick Kelleher, Esq. PLLC
Represented By: Denis Patrick Kelleher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Trust 12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tom C Evans Charles Schwab & Co Inc cust Roth Conversion IRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: M Hakan & R Salkin Trustees of the Michael J. Hakan Charitable Re U/A Dated
Represented By: William A. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wabash Harvest Partners LP
Represented By: David Keith Momborquette
Represented By: Brian Theodore Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mutual Fund 26
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 27
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Trust 9
Represented By: Sandra Dawn Grannum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Vicki M Wadler Living Trust UAD Vicki M Wadler Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 10
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Merebis Master Fund Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Corporation 44
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Geza Szayer Paulette Szayer
Represented By: William A. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 36
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Affiliate of Mutual Fund 12
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Robert Emery & Dana Emery, Trustees of the Robert L & Dana M Emery Family U/A Dated
Represented By: Sandra Dawn Grannum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bellsouth Group Life Trust - S& A/K/A Bellsouth Corporation RFA Veba Trust
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Peter J. Macdonald
Represented By: Jeremy S. Winer
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hillary L. Shane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Family Foundation 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Pension Fund 2
Represented By: Daniel R. Swetnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Affiliate of Corporation 1
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sandra A Smith Ten/Com
Represented By: John F. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NBCN, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Elisabeth H. Doft
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 9
Represented By: Christopher Charles Gartman
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Corporation 4
Represented By: Robert T. Honeywell
Represented By: Richard S. Miller
Represented By: Brian David Koosed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 9
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Palomino Fund Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Pension Fund 1
Represented By: Daniel R. Swetnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Pension Fund 5
Represented By: Patrick Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Virginia L. Lyon
Represented By: Robert E. Bartkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Redbourn Partners Ltd.
Represented By: Richard S. Miller
Represented By: Ryan M. Tosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mutual Fund 21
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Touradji Global Resources Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Ana M. Alfonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rockbay Capital Fund LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OP&F / Intech
Represented By: Daniel R. Swetnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rockbay Capital Offshore Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Litespeed Master Fund Ltd.
Represented By: David Parker
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: First NY Securities / Britally Capital A/K/A First New York Securities, LLC
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Peter J. Macdonald
Represented By: Jeremy S. Winer
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 3
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Financial Advisor 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fursa Master Global Event Driven Fund LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Affiliate of Mutual Fund 10
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 29
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: David Leshner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fishbein Advisory Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Cato Enterprises LLC Arbitrage Account
Represented By: Craig Scott Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 25
Represented By: Christopher Charles Gartman
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 35
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Corporation 2
Represented By: David Barry Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jack H Cain & Esther Cain Trustee Cain Trust U/A Dated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Working Womans Home Association
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 5
Represented By: David Parker
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Louis S Rouse & Mary A Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Pension Fund 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Yield Strategies Fund II, LP
Represented By: Robert T. Honeywell
Represented By: Richard S. Miller
Represented By: Ryan M. Tosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Harvest Master Enhanced Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Financial Advisor 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 4
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Peter J. Macdonald
Represented By: Jeremy S. Winer
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mutual Fund 25
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mutual Fund 12
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Peter J. Macdonald
Represented By: Jeremy S. Winer
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Plasma Physics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tinicum Partners, L.P.
Represented By: David Parker
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 14
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jack H Cain Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Rollover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Affiliate of Broker-Dealer 1
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 32
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Primevest Financial Services
Represented By: William Hao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Glazer Offshore Fund Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 15
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Peter J. Macdonald
Represented By: Jeremy S. Winer
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 27
Represented By: Sandra Dawn Grannum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rangeley Capital Partners LP
Represented By: Mark Joseph Hyland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mutual Fund 29
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mary B Ord UTA Charles Schwab & Co Inc IRA Contributory Dated
Represented By: Sandra Dawn Grannum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PSAM Europe Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Ana M. Alfonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Masons Annuity Sierra/Glenmede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Deere Pension Trust
Represented By: Richard S. Miller
Represented By: Ryan M. Tosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BellSouth Corporation RFA VEBA Trust
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Harvest AA Capital LP
Represented By: Brian Theodore Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Donald M Balcuns Living Trust Donald M Balcuns and Jennie Anne Balcuns
Represented By: Jonathan S. Pasternak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gabelli Associates
Represented By: Andrew J Entwistle
Represented By: Vincent Roger Cappucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mutual Fund 10
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Peter J. Macdonald
Represented By: Jeremy S. Winer
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund 18
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Individual 14
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BACAP Equity Fund XXI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MJR Partners
Represented By: Jessica Wheeler
Represented By: Hanna A. Baek
Represented By: Philip David Anker
Represented By: Ross Eric Firsenbaum
Represented By: Andrew Easton Glantz
Represented By: Ari Joseph Savitzky
Represented By: Michael A Guippone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Timothy Ord UTA Charles Schwab & Co Inc IRA Contributory Dated
Represented By: Sandra Dawn Grannum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Trust 17
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance