In re Banco Bradesco S.A. Securities Litigation
Plaintiff: Bryan, Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust and William Bryan
Defendant: Banco Bradesco S.A, Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Julio De Siqueira Carvalho Araujo, Alexandre Da Silva Gluher, Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi, Luiz Carlos Angelotti and Banco Bradesco S.A.
Petitioner: Policemens Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago, Louis Jean and Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago
Lead Plaintiff: Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi
Case Number: 1:2016cv04155
Filed: June 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 199 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/12/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 30, 2019 Filing 198 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/12/2019 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/30/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/28/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE granting #187 Motion for Settlement. The Court hereby preliminarily approves the Settlement, as embodied in the Stipulation, and finds that the Parties have shown the Court that it will likely be able to approve the proposed Settlement as being fair, reasonable and adequate to the Settlement Class under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(e)(2), subject to further consideration at the Settlement Fairness Hearing to be conducted as described below. The Court will hold a hearing (the "Settlement Fairness Hearing") on November 13, 2019 at 4:15 p.m. in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007; as further set forth herein. The Court retains jurisdiction to consider all further applications arising out of or connected with the proposed Settlement. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/24/2019) (mro)
July 24, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 04:15 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (mro)
July 23, 2019 Filing 196 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. dated July 23, 2019 re: proposed dates for settlement fairness hearing. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Whitman, Johnston)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER. Lead Plaintiff is directed to submit a Word version of the proposed preliminary order approving settlement, Dkt. No. 193-4, and pdf versions of all proposed exhibits to that order, to the Chambers email account, no later than July 23, 2019. The parties are further directed to submit via ECF a letter proposing dates for the anticipated settlement fairness hearing by the same date. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on July 22, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER. The Court is in possession of documents produced by Brazilian authorities in response to letters rogatory issued by this Court on May 3, 2018. Lead Plaintiff is directed to contact Chambers to schedule a time to pick up these documents. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on July 22, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony)
July 19, 2019 Filing 193 DECLARATION of Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. in Support re: #187 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Order Preliminarily Approving Proposed Class Action Settlement and Authorizing Dissemination of Notice to the Settlement Class.. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Stephanie Amin-Giwner, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Chad Coffman, #3 Exhibit 3 - Redline Postcard Notice, #4 Exhibit 4 - Redline Proposed Preliminary Approval Order)(Whitman, Johnston)
July 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 7/12/2019. (Daniels, Anthony)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER. On July 1, 2019 Lead Plaintiff served its unopposed motion for an order preliminarily approving the proposed settlement. The Court will hold a teleconference to discuss that motion on July 12, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. The parties are directed to call Chambers (212-805-0296) at that time with all parties on the line. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on July 9, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER terminating #137 Motion to Certify Class; terminating #149 Motion. The hearing scheduled for July 10 and 11, 2019 is adjourned sine die. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions pending at Dkt. Nos. 137 and 149. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/3/2019) (cf)
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #190 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
July 1, 2019 Filing 190 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. Related Document Number: #187 . (Zivitz, Andrew) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 1, 2019 Filing 189 DECLARATION of Andrew L. Zivitz in Support re: #187 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Order Preliminarily Approving Proposed Class Action Settlement and Authorizing Dissemination of Notice to the Settlement Class.. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement, #2 Exhibit B - Epiq Brochure)(Zivitz, Andrew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 188 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #187 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Order Preliminarily Approving Proposed Class Action Settlement and Authorizing Dissemination of Notice to the Settlement Class. . Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Zivitz, Andrew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 187 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Order Preliminarily Approving Proposed Class Action Settlement and Authorizing Dissemination of Notice to the Settlement Class. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Zivitz, Andrew)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER. The Court is in possession of documents produced by the judicial authorities of Brazil in response to letters rogatory issued by this Court on May 3, 2018. Plaintiffs are directed to contact Chambers to schedule a time to pick up these documents. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on June 13, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER. The hearing scheduled for May 14 and 15, 2019 is adjourned to July 10 and 11, 2019. The hearing will commence at 9:30 a.m. on those dates. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on April 22, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony) Modified on 4/22/2019 (Daniels, Anthony).
April 5, 2019 Filing 184 DECLARATION of Alana M. Longmoore (Third Supplemental Declaration) in Opposition re: #137 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel.. Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L - Second Reply Report of Professor Amy Hutton, #2 Exhibit M - Excerpts from Deposition Transcript of Professor Amy Hutton)(Pepperman, Richard)
April 5, 2019 Filing 183 SECOND REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #137 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel. Response to Lead Plaintiff's Sur-Sur-Reply in Further Support of Its Motion for Class Certification. Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Pepperman, Richard)
March 8, 2019 Filing 182 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #137 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel. Memorandum of Law in Response to Defendants' Sur-Reply and in Further Support of Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Third Supplemental Declaration of Richard A. Russo, Jr., #2 Exhibit K - Expert Sur-Sur Reply Report of Chad Coffman, #3 Exhibit L - Excerpts of Deposition Transcript of Amy Hutton)(Russo, Richard)
March 8, 2019 Filing 181 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/26/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 8, 2019 Filing 180 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/26/2019 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Smith, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER. As discussed on the record during the February 26, 2019 teleconference, the Court will hold an evidentiary hearing on May 14 and 15, 2019. The hearing will be held in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007, and will commence at 9:30 a.m on each day. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on February 26, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony)
February 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 2/26/2019. (Court Reporter Lisa Smith) (Daniels, Anthony)
February 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #177 Letter, filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The Court adopts the supplemental briefing schedule proposed by the parties. The Court also adopts Defendants' proposed schedule for the evidentiary hearing as articulated above. The Court will hold a teleconference to discuss the hearing on February 26, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. The parties are directed to call Chambers (212-805-0296) at that time with all parties on the line. The Court is unavailable on the week of May 20, 2019. As an alternative, the Court proposes May 14 and 15, 2019 as the hearing dates. The Court expects to discuss the parties' views regarding the hearing dates during the February 25, 2019 teleconference. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 2/26/2019 at 01:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/18/2019) (rro)
February 15, 2019 Filing 177 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. and Marc De Leeuw dated February 15, 2019 re: February 7, 2019 Order (ECF No. 173). Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Whitman, Johnston)
February 7, 2019 Filing 176 DECLARATION of Julio Cesar Bueno in Opposition re: #137 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel.. Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Website unavailability reports, #2 Exhibit B - Instructions on how to access unavailability reports, #3 Exhibit C - Judge Oliveira's decision, #4 Exhibit D - Exclusive O Estado article, #5 Exhibit E - Prosecutor's e-mail, #6 Exhibit F - Main webpage, #7 Exhibit G - History of activity webpage, #8 Exhibit H - Entire contents webpage, #9 Exhibit I - Court hours of operation, #10 Exhibit J - Leite moving paper, #11 Exhibit K - Decision meta data)(Longmoore, Alana)
February 7, 2019 Filing 175 DECLARATION of Alana M. Longmoore (Second Supplemental Declaration) in Opposition re: #137 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel.. Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J - Reply Report of Professor Amy Hutton, #2 Exhibit K - Excerpts from Deposition Transcript of Professor Amy Hutton)(Longmoore, Alana)
February 7, 2019 Filing 174 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #137 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel. . Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Pepperman, Richard)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting #172 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application granted. The Court accepts the sur-reply and supporting materials submitted along with this letter, and intends to schedule an evidentiary hearing to determine whether the Defendants have adequately demonstrated a lack of negative-price impact correlated with the corrective disclosures at issue in this case. The parties are directed to confer, and present the Court with a joint letter setting forth their views on how much time the parties need to prepare for such a hearing, and what, if any, additional pre-hearing submissions would prove beneficial to the Court. The Court expects that letter to be submitted no later than February 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/7/2019) (anc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 172 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Further Opposition to Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certificaton and for an Evidentiary Hearing, addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Richard C. Pepperman II dated February 1, 2019. Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Sur-Reply Memorandum, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Second Supplemental Longmoore Declaration attaching Reply Report of Amy Hutton and Hutton Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Bueno Declaration)(Pepperman, Richard)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER MODIFYING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the request is GRANTED and the pre-trial schedule is modified as follows: Fact Discovery due by 8/15/2019. Deposition due by 8/15/2019. Expert Discovery due by 12/20/2019. Motions for summary judgment due by 1/24/2020. Except as modified in this Order, all dates in the Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (Docket No. 80) remain in effect. This order may not be modified or the dates herein extended, except by further Order of this Court for good cause shown. Any application to modify or extend the dates herein (except as provided in paragraph 6(e)) shall be made in a written application in accordance with Rule 1.E of the Court's Individual Rules and must be made no less than 2 business days prior to the expiration of the date sought to be extended. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/2/2019) (rro)
January 2, 2019 Filing 170 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. dated January 2, 2019 re: modification of civil case management plan and scheduling order. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Whitman, Johnston)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #168 Motion for James P. McEvilly, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
December 19, 2018 Filing 168 MOTION for James P. McEvilly, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James P. McEvilly, III, #2 Exhibit A - PA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit C - DE Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(McEvilly, James)
December 19, 2018 Filing 167 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. Related Document Number: #166 . (McEvilly, James) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 12/19/2018 (ma).
December 19, 2018 Filing 166 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for James P. McEvilly, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16080224. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James P. McEvilly, III, #2 Exhibit A - PA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit C - DE Certificate of Good Standing)(McEvilly, James) Modified on 12/19/2018 (ma).
December 19, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #168 MOTION for James P. McEvilly, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 19, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #166 MOTION for James P. McEvilly, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16080224. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): THE PROPOSED ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AS AN EXHIBIT TO THE MOTION.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma)
December 14, 2018 Filing 165 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #137 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel. . Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Second Supplemental Declaration of Richard A. Russo, Jr., #2 Exhibit H - Expert Rebuttal Report of Chad Coffman, CFA, #3 Exhibit I - Excerpts of Deposition Transcript of Amy Hutton, #4 Exhibit J - Declaration of Fabiano Deffenti)(Russo, Richard)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting #163 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application granted. Lead Plaintiff is granted leave to file a reply memorandum of no longer than 15 pages in length. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/4/2018) (jca)
December 3, 2018 Filing 163 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. dated December 3, 2018. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Whitman, Johnston)
November 28, 2018 Filing 162 DECLARATION of Alana M. Longmoore (Supplemental Declaration) in Opposition re: #137 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel.. Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I - Declaration of Amy Hutton)(Longmoore, Alana)
November 10, 2018 Filing 161 DECLARATION of Alana M. Longmoore in Opposition re: #137 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel.. Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Longmoore, Alana)
November 9, 2018 Filing 160 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #137 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel. . Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Pepperman, Richard)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #158 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application granted. Defendants are granted leave to file a memorandum of law in opposition to Lead Plaintiffs motion for class certification of no more than 30 pages in length. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/6/2018) (jca)
November 5, 2018 Filing 158 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Richard C. Pepperman II dated November 5, 2018. Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi.(Pepperman, Richard)
October 24, 2018 Filing 157 DECLARATION of Richard A. Russo, Jr. (Supplemental Declaration) in Support re: #137 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel.. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G - Declaration of Chad Coffman, CFA)(Russo, Richard)
September 28, 2018 Filing 156 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #149 MOTION for Leave to Add Proposed Class Representative . . Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Zivitz, Andrew)
September 24, 2018 Filing 155 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #149 MOTION for Leave to Add Proposed Class Representative . . Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Pepperman, Richard)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties, that, subject to the Court's approval: The deadline for Defendants to file and serve their submissions in opposition to the Class Certification Motion is changed from October 19, 2018 to November 9, 2018. The deadline for Lead Plaintiff to file and serve its reply submissions in further support of the Class Certification Motion is changed from November 20, 2018 to December 14, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 11/9/2018. Replies due by 12/14/2018.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/23/2018) (anc)
September 21, 2018 Filing 153 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Zivitz, Andrew)
September 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #152 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
September 14, 2018 Filing 152 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. Related Document Number: #149 . (Zivitz, Andrew) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 14, 2018 Filing 151 DECLARATION of Andrew L. Zivitz in Support re: #149 MOTION for Leave to Add Proposed Class Representative .. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 6/27/18 Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendants' Responses and Objections to Lead Plaintiff's First Requests for Admission, #3 Exhibit 3 - Defendants' Second Request for Production of Documents, #4 Exhibit 4 - In re Pfizer ECF No. 246, #5 Exhibit 5 - In re Pfizer ECF No. 223, #6 Exhibit 6 - In re Lehman ECF No. 727, #7 Exhibit 7 - In re Lehman ECF No. 502)(Zivitz, Andrew)
September 14, 2018 Filing 150 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #149 MOTION for Leave to Add Proposed Class Representative . . Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Zivitz, Andrew)
September 14, 2018 Filing 149 MOTION for Leave to Add Proposed Class Representative . Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Zivitz, Andrew)
September 4, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 9/4/2018. (Daniels, Anthony)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER. On September 4, 2018, the Court held a teleconference to discuss Defendants' proposed motion to strike. Dkt. No. 144. For the reasons stated on the record during the teleconference, Defendants' proposed motion is not germane at this time. Plaintiffs are invited to submit an application for leave to add an additional lead plaintiff no later than September 14, 2018. Defendants' response, if any, is due no later than September 24, 2018. Plaintiffs' reply, if any, is due no later than September 28, 2018. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on September 4, 2018) (Woods, Gregory)
August 29, 2018 Filing 147 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/27/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 29, 2018 Filing 146 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/27/2018 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 27, 2018 Filing 145 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Andrew L. Zivitz dated August 27, 2018 re: Response to Defendants' August 21, 2018 Letter. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Zivitz, Andrew)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER. Defendants' request for a pre-motion conference is granted. The Court will hold a teleconference regarding defendants proposed motion to strike on September 4, 2018 at 11 a.m. The parties are directed to call Chambers (212-805-0296) at that time with all parties on the line. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on August 22, 2018) (Text Only Order)(Woods, Gregory)
August 21, 2018 Filing 143 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Richard C. Pepperman II dated August 21, 2018 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference on Defendants' Motion to Strike. Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi.(Pepperman, Richard)
August 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #140 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
August 17, 2018 Filing 142 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alfred Louis Fatale, III on behalf of Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust. (Fatale, Alfred)
August 17, 2018 Filing 141 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Gardner on behalf of Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust. (Gardner, Jonathan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 140 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. Related Document Number: #137 . (Russo, Richard) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 17, 2018 Filing 139 DECLARATION of Richard A. Russo, Jr. in Support re: #137 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel.. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of Chad Coffman, CFA, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of George W. Neville, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Mario Rodriguez, #4 Exhibit D - Excerpts from Defendants' Responses and Objections to Lead Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission, #5 Exhibit E - Firm Resume of KTMC, #6 Exhibit F - Firm Resume of Labaton)(Russo, Richard)
August 17, 2018 Filing 138 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #137 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel. . Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Russo, Richard)
August 17, 2018 Filing 137 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Russo, Richard)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #135 Motion for Jason Matthew Kirschberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory)
July 24, 2018 Filing 135 MOTION for Jason Matthew Kirschberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15361468. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Mississippi, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - California, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Alabama, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kirschberg, Jason)
July 24, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #135 MOTION for Jason Matthew Kirschberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15361468. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
June 27, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 6/27/2018. (Court Reporter Eve Giniger) (Daniels, Anthony)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #133 Letter filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The Court will hold a telephone conference to discuss the anticipated motion for class certification on June 27, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. The parties are directed to jointly call Chambers (212-805-0296) at that time with all parties on the line. SO ORDERED., ( Telephone Conference set for 6/27/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/22/2018) (ama)
June 22, 2018 Filing 133 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. dated June 22, 2018 re: pre-motion conference on Plaintiff's motion for class certification. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Whitman, Johnston)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting #131 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Michael Stocker is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for lead Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove Mr. Stocker from the list of counsel in this case. SO ORDERED. (Attorney Michael Walter Stocker terminated.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/18/2018) (anc)
June 15, 2018 Filing 131 MOTION for Michael Walter Stocker to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Stocker, Michael)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL denying without prejudice #129 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied without prejudice. Jonathan Gardner purports to withdraw the appearance of Michael Stocker on his behalf, but asserts no basis for his authority to do so. Mr. Stocker is directed to file a motion to withdraw on his own behalf. That motion must comply with Local Civil Rule 1.4. To the extent Mr. Stocker is unable to move to withdraw on his own behalf, Labaton Sucharow LLP should so inform the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/14/2018) (anc)
June 13, 2018 Filing 129 MOTION for Michael W. Stocker to Withdraw as Attorney and be Removed from the Court's Service List for Lead Plaintiff Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Gardner, Jonathan)
May 25, 2018 Filing 128 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #125 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Rachel Harris is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove Ms. Harris from the list of counsel in this case. Attorney Rachel Stephanie Harris terminated. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/25/2018) (mro)
May 25, 2018 Filing 127 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #126 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Owen Wolfe is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove Mr. Wolfe from the list of counsel in this case. Attorney Owen Richard Wolfe terminated. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/25/2018) (mro)
May 24, 2018 Filing 126 MOTION for Owen Richard Wolfe to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi.(Wolfe, Owen)
May 24, 2018 Filing 125 MOTION for Rachel S. Harris to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi.(Harris, Rachel)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #123 Notice (Other) filed by Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A. ENDORSEMENT: Local Civil Rule 1.4 provides that leave of court is required before an attorney may withdraw his or her representation. Ms. Harris is directed to fully comply with the requirements of Local Civil Rule 1.4. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/23/2018) (anc)
May 22, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Harris, Rachel)
May 22, 2018 Filing 122 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alana Mary Longmoore on behalf of Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Longmoore, Alana)
May 16, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 4/19/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 16, 2018 Filing 120 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 4/19/2018 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 3, 2018 LETTERS ROGATORY ISSUED on May 3, 2018, and picked up by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP, to obtain testimony of General Director of Federal Police Rogerio Augusto Viana Gallaro, Pagnozzi Consultoria Empresarial Ltda (formerly Pagnozzi, Calazans & Associados Consultoria Epresarial S/C Ltda), MPJ Consultoria Comercial Eirelo (formerly Pagnozzi Pagnozzi & Associados Consultoria S/S Ltda), Eduardo Cerqueria Leite, Jose Teruji Tamazato, JOrge Victor Rodrigues and Ministerio Publico Federal, in Brazil. (km)
May 2, 2018 Filing 119 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 4/19/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 2, 2018 Filing 118 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 4/19/2018 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 30, 2018 Filing 117 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. dated April 30, 2018 re: Revised Letters of Request for Leite and Pagnozzi. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Revised Letter of Request (Leite), #2 Exhibit 2 - Revised Letter of Request (Pagnozzi))(Whitman, Johnston)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER. The Court has reviewed the revised letters rogatory submitted for the Court's signature by Lead Plaintiff. The Court asks that Lead Plaintiff make two additional corrections. First, the cover page to the Leite letter contains a page number that should be removed. Second, Exhibit A to the Pagnozzi Jr. letter still contains ambiguous references to "messages" in requests 10, 11, and 12, which should be edited to reflect either "text and other electronic messages" or another more clearly defined meaning of the word "message." Lead Plaintiff is directed to make these changes, file the revised Leite and Pagnozzi letters, and submit revised hard copies of those two letters for the Court's signature, with signature pages flagged. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on April 30, 2018) (Text Only Order)(Woods, Gregory)
April 27, 2018 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. in Support re: #107 MOTION Issuance of Letters of Request .. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Whitman, Johnston)
April 27, 2018 Filing 114 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. dated April 27, 2018 re: Revised Letters of Request. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Revised Letter of Request (Leite), #2 Exhibit 2 - Revised Letter of Request (Pagnozzi), #3 Exhibit 3 - Revised Letter of Request (Tamazato), #4 Exhibit 4 - Revised Letter of Request (Victor), #5 Exhibit 5 - Revised Letter of Request (Federal Prosecutor), #6 Exhibit 6 - Revised Letter of Request (Federal Police), #7 Exhibit 7 - Revised Letter of Request (Pagnozzi Entities), #8 Exhibit 8 - Blackline Letter of Request (Leite), #9 Exhibit 9 - Blackline Letter of Request (Pagnozzi), #10 Exhibit 10 - Blackline Letter of Request (Tamazato), #11 Exhibit 11 - Blackline Letter of Request (Victor), #12 Exhibit 12 - Blackline Letter of Request (Federal Prosecutor), #13 Exhibit 13 - Blackline Letter of Request (Federal Police), #14 Exhibit 14 - Blackline Letter of Request (Pagnozzi Entities))(Whitman, Johnston)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #107 . Lead Plaintiff's motion for issuance of letters rogatory to the judicial authorities of Brazil is granted. Lead Plaintiff is directed to make the edits to the letters rogatory discussed on the record during the telephone conference on April 19, 2018. As discussed during that conference, the language suggested by the Court to be added to the end of the introductory statements of each letter, immediately following the sentence that reads, "This suit is currently in discovery and proceeding toward trial," is as follows: "Under United States law, a party may seek in discovery documents and other information that are relevant to its claims or defenses. Documents and information obtained during discovery may or may not be admissible at trial. This Court has not yet made any determinations regarding the admissibility of the documents requested." Also as discussed during the conference, the Court suggests adding the following introductory language to each of the specific document requests at Exhibit A of each letter, to be modified in accordance with the respondent of whom the request is to be made: "Pursuant to the Hague Convention, this Court respectfully requests that the appropriate judicial authority in Brazil compel [respondent name] to produce the following documents within [his/its/their] possession, custody, or control, to the extent the documents exist, for inspection or copying in connection with the litigation of In re Banco Bradesco S.A. Securities Litigation, Case No. 1:16-cv-4155 (GHW), pending before the Southern District of New York." After making the discussed changes, Lead Plaintiff is directed to file on the docket a clean and a blackline version of each of the letters and to submit to Chambers a hard copy of each letter for the Court's signature, with signature pages flagged for the Court's convenience. Lead Plaintiff is also directed to file an affidavit providing the factual predicate for each of the factual assertions contained in the letters rogatory. The Court expects that the revised letters and affidavit will be filed no later than April 27, 2018. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory)
April 19, 2018 Filing 112 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #107 MOTION Issuance of Letters of Request . . Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr., #2 Exhibit A - Redline, #3 Exhibit B - 3/26/18 Email from M. De Leeuw, #4 Exhibit C - 3/26/18 Email from J. Whitman)(Whitman, Johnston)
April 19, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 4/19/2018. (Court Reporter Alena Lynch) (Daniels, Anthony)
April 17, 2018 Filing 111 DECLARATION of Marc De Leeuw in Opposition re: #107 MOTION Issuance of Letters of Request .. Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - March 9 Email and Attachments, #2 Exhibit 2 - March 14 Email, #3 Exhibit 3 - March 19 Email, #4 Exhibit 4 - March 23 Email, #5 Exhibit 5 - March 26 Email (First), #6 Exhibit 6 - March 26 Email (Second), #7 Exhibit 7 - March 28 Email)(De Leeuw, Marc)
April 17, 2018 Filing 110 RESPONSE to Motion re: #107 MOTION Issuance of Letters of Request . . Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Revised Letter of Request)(Pepperman, Richard)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER. The Court has reviewed the request for letters rogatory filed by Lead Plaintiff at Dkt. No. 107. The Court will hold a telephone conference on April 19, 2018 at 4:45 p.m. to discuss the request. The Court expects to address in particular the dispute regarding the inclusion of language in connection with Article 23 of the Hague Convention, the factual predicate of various statements contained in the proposed letters, and the nature and scope of certain document requests. The parties are directed to jointly call Chambers (212-805-0296) on April 19, 2018 at 4:45 p.m. with all parties on the line. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on April 13, 2018) (Text Only Order)(Woods, Gregory)
April 10, 2018 Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #107 MOTION Issuance of Letters of Request . . Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Letter of Request (Leite), #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Letter of Request (Pagnozzi), #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Letter of Request (Tamazato), #4 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Letter of Request (Victor), #5 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Letter of Request (Federal Prosecutor), #6 Exhibit 6 - Proposed Letter of Request (Federal Police), #7 Exhibit 7 - Proposed Letter of Request (Pagnozzi Entities), #8 Exhibit 8 - Hague Convention, #9 Exhibit 9 - Conclusions and Recommendations)(Whitman, Johnston)
April 10, 2018 Filing 107 MOTION Issuance of Letters of Request . Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitman, Johnston)
April 6, 2018 Filing 106 AMENDED ANSWER to #45 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Pepperman, Richard)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...The Court endorses the parties' proposed protective order subject to one modification to the last sentence in paragraph 8. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/27/2018) (mro)
February 27, 2018 Filing 104 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. dated February 27, 2018 re: Proposed Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - Blackline of Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order, #3 Exhibit C - Stipulation Regarding the Format of Document Productions)(Whitman, Johnston)
February 20, 2018 Filing 103 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #102 Letter, filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The deadline for Lead Plaintiff to file any motion regarding the sufficiency of Defendants' answer is extended to March 30, 2018. ( Motions due by 3/30/2018.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/20/2018) (mro)
February 20, 2018 Filing 102 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. dated February 20, 2018 re: extension of time to file motion to strike Defendants' Answer. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Whitman, Johnston)
January 31, 2018 Filing 101 ANSWER to #45 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi.(Pepperman, Richard)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #99 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint is extended to January 31, 2018. Luiz Carlos Angelotti answer due 1/31/2018; Julio De Siqueira Carvalho Araujo answer due 1/31/2018; Banco Bradesco S.A. answer due 1/31/2018; Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi answer due 1/31/2018; Alexandre Da Silva Gluher answer due 1/31/2018. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/16/2018) (mro)
January 16, 2018 Filing 99 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #45 Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Richard C. Pepperman, II dated January 16, 2018. Document filed by Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi.(Pepperman, Richard)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #97 granting MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. ENDORSEMENT: Marina Miller is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi, and Luiz Carlos Angelotti. The Clerk of Court is instructed to remove Ms. Miller from the list of counsel in this case. SO ORDERED. Attorney Marina Miller terminated. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/29/2017) (ama)
December 28, 2017 Filing 97 MOTION for Marina Miller to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi, and Luiz Carlos Angelotti. Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi.(Miller, Marina)
December 28, 2017 Filing 96 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #95 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL, filed by Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A. ENDORSEMENT: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4, leave of court is required for counsel to withdraw. Ms. Miller is directed to comply with the requirements of Local Rule 1.4. The Clerk of Court is directed to take no action with respect to Ms. Miller's Notice of Withdrawal at Dkt. No. 95. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/28/2017) (ap)
December 27, 2017 Filing 95 NOTICE of Withdrawal As Counsel. Document filed by Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Miller, Marina)
December 19, 2017 Filing 94 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/21/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 19, 2017 Filing 93 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/21/2017 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 13, 2017 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Stephanie Harris on behalf of Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Harris, Rachel)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. The Court has entered the case management plan and scheduling order as proposed by the parties. The Court endorsed the parties' proposed schedule with respect to a pre-motion conference request related to any class certification motion, in lieu of the schedule discussed during the November 21, 2017 status conference. Thus, any request for a pre-motion conference related to the anticipated class certification motion is due no later than June 22, 2018. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on November 22, 2017) (Text Only Order)(Woods, Gregory)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. Except for amendments permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1) and this Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases ("Individual Rules"), amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except as addressed herein or with leave of the Court. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. Fact Discovery due by 2/15/2019. Depositions due by 2/15/2019. Expert Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Motions due by 7/26/2019. The joint pretrial order shall be due 30 days from the close of discovery, or if any dispositive motion is filed, 21 days from the Court's decision on such motion. The filing of the joint pretrial order and additional submissions shall be governed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3) and the Court's Individual Rule 5. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 10-14 trial days. Lead Plaintiff will file and serve its class certification motion, including any expert report(s) in support of the motion, by August17, 2018. Responses due by 10/19/2018. Replies due by 11/20/2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/22/2017) (anc) Modified on 1/5/2018 (anc).
November 21, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/21/2017. (Court Reporter Tom Murray) (Daniels, Anthony)
November 17, 2017 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Gardner on behalf of Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Gardner, Jonathan)
November 14, 2017 Filing 88 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. dated November 14, 2017 re: Case Status. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Whitman, Johnston)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #86 Letter regarding amendment filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. ENDORSEMENT:The Court will hold a status conference on November 21, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. The parties are directed to submit a joint status letter and proposed case management plan and scheduling order as described in the Court's August 22, 2016 order (Dkt. No. 25) no later than November 14, 2017. ( Status Conference set for 11/21/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/30/2017) (rj)
October 30, 2017 Filing 86 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. dated October 30, 2017 re: amendment. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Whitman, Johnston)
September 29, 2017 Filing 85 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #84 Memorandum & Opinion, Add and Terminate Parties. (vf)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OPINION AND ORDER re: #63 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff has pleaded a claim under Section 10(b) of the Exchange Act and Rule 10b-5 thereunder with respect to the following statements and as against the following defendants: (1) the August 8, 2014 press release (as against Bradesco and Angelotti); (2) statements about Bradesco's Code of Ethical Conduct (but not the Code itself) and anti-corruption statements in Forms 20-F filed after October 9, 2014, and certifications made in post-October 9, 2014 filings attesting that the reports "d[id] not contain any untrue statement of a material fact or omit to state a material fact necessary to make the statements made, in light of the circumstances under which they were made, not misleading with respect to the period covered by this report" (as against by Bradesco and Trabuco); (3) the March 31, 2015 press release filed with the SEC on April 10, 2015 (as against by Bradesco and Angelotti); and (4) the May 31, 2016 "Notice to the Market" filed with the SEC on June 1, 2016, as well as the June 9, 2016 "reiteration" of the "clarifications provided in" the May 31 Notice (as against Bradesco and Angelotti). Plaintiff has also pleaded a claim under Section 20(a) of the Exchange Act against Trabuco. In all other respects, Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted. The dismissal includes all claims against Defendant Abreu. Because the Court cannot conclude that further amendment of the complaint would be futile, the Court grants Plaintiff leave to file a second amended complaint solely to cure the deficiencies identified in this opinion no later than 30 days from the date of this order. See Loreley, 797 F.3d at 191. Discovery in this action will remain stayed until further order of the Court. If Plaintiff does not file a second amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this order, the Court expects to set a status conference to initiate discovery shortly thereafter. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 63. SO ORDERED. (Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu terminated.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/29/2017) (anc)
September 29, 2017 Filing 83 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Richard C. Pepperman II dated September 29, 2017 re: Supplemental Authority on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pepperman, Richard)
July 21, 2017 Filing 82 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. dated July 21, 2017 re: Response to Defendants' June 30, 2017 Letter Brief. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Whitman, Johnston)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMO ENDORSED on re: #80 Letter, filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The deadline for Plaintiff to file its response to Defendants' June 30, 2017 letter brief is extended to July 21, 2017. So Ordered( Responses due by 7/21/2017) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/6/2017) (js)
July 6, 2017 Filing 80 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman dated July 6, 2017 re: request for extension of time to respond to Defendants' letter brief. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Whitman, Johnston)
June 30, 2017 Filing 79 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Richard C. Pepperman II dated June 30, 2017 re: Letter Brief. Document filed by Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1, #2 Exhibit A - 2, #3 Exhibit A - 3, #4 Exhibit A - 4)(Pepperman, Richard)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #77 Letter, filed by Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks Defendants for this update. Defendants are invited to submit a letter brief describing their views of the impact of this development on their pending motion to dismiss. If Defendants make such a submission, Plaintiffs may submit a letter brief in response no later than 14 days after service of Defendants' letter brief. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/19/2017) (anc)
June 16, 2017 Filing 77 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Richard C. Pepperman II dated June 16, 2017 re: Supplemental Authority Relevant to the Pending Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brazilian Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Notice to the Market, #3 Exhibit Reuters Article)(Pepperman, Richard)
June 5, 2017 Filing 76 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #75 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A.. ENDORSEMENT: Attorney Tina Gonzalez Barton is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove Attorney Barton from the caption of this case. Attorney Tina Gonzalez Barton terminated. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/5/2017) (mro)
May 31, 2017 Filing 75 NOTICE of Withdrawal As Counsel of Tina Gonzalez Barton. Document filed by Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Barton, Tina)
March 3, 2017 Filing 74 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Tina Gonzalez Barton in Support re: #63 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L)(Barton, Tina)
March 3, 2017 Filing 73 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #63 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Pepperman, Richard)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #63 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Class Action Complaint. Application granted. The deadline for Defendants to file and serve a reply in support of their motion to dismiss is extended to March 3, 2017. Replies due by 3/3/2017. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/16/2017) (tro)
February 15, 2017 Filing 71 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #63 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Class Action Complaint. addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Richard C. Pepperman, II dated February 15, 2017. Document filed by Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi.(Pepperman, Richard)
February 3, 2017 Filing 70 DECLARATION of Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. in Opposition re: #63 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Whitman, Johnston)
February 3, 2017 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #63 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Whitman, Johnston)
January 30, 2017 Filing 68 NOTICE of of Filing of Corrected Exhibit D to the Declaration of Tina Gonzalez Barton - Part 1 of 3 re: #65 Declaration in Support of Motion,,. Document filed by Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 2 of 3, #2 Exhibit Part 3 of 3)(Pepperman, Richard)
January 17, 2017 Filing 67 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/7/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 17, 2017 Filing 66 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 12/7/2016 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 23, 2016 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Tina Gonzalez Barton in Support re: #63 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D Part 1 of 3, #5 Exhibit D Part 2 of 3, #6 Exhibit D Part 3 of 3, #7 Exhibit E Part 1 of 2, #8 Exhibit E Part 2 of 2, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I)(Barton, Tina)
December 23, 2016 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #63 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Pepperman, Richard)
December 23, 2016 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi.(Pepperman, Richard)
December 9, 2016 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marina Miller on behalf of Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Miller, Marina)
December 7, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/7/2016. (Court Reporter Jennifer Thun) (Daniels, Anthony)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. As stated on the record during the conference held on December 7, 2016, Lead Plaintiff is relieved of the obligation to provide the Court with further status reports on service in this matter. Defendants are granted leave to file a motion to dismiss. The motion to dismiss is due no later December 23, 2016. Lead Plaintiff's opposition is due no later than February 3, 2017. Defendants' reply, if any, is due no later than February 24, 2017. The parties are granted leave to exceed the page limitations established in the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases as follows: Defendants' opening brief is not to exceed 60 pages. Lead Plaintiff's opposition brief is not to exceed the length of Defendants' opening brief. Defendants' reply brief, if any, is not to exceed 25 pages. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on December 7, 2016) (Text Only Order)(Woods, Gregory)
December 6, 2016 Filing 60 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. dated December 6, 2016 re: pre-motion conference on Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Whitman, Johnston)
December 2, 2016 Filing 59 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #58 Letter re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference, filed by Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A. Application granted. The Court will hold a pre-motion conference to discuss Defendants' proposed motion to dismiss during the initial pretrial conference scheduled to take place on December 7, 2016 at 4:00 p.m. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 12/7/2016 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/2/2016) (cla)
December 2, 2016 Filing 58 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Richard C. Pepperman, II dated December 2, 2016 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi.(Pepperman, Richard)
December 2, 2016 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tina Gonzalez Barton on behalf of Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Barton, Tina)
December 2, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc De Leeuw on behalf of Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (De Leeuw, Marc)
December 2, 2016 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard C. Pepperman, II on behalf of Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Angelotti, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (Pepperman, Richard)
November 30, 2016 Filing 54 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. dated November 30, 2016 re: Case Status. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Whitman, Johnston)
November 28, 2016 Filing 53 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. dated November 28, 2016 re: service of the Complaint and responses thereto pursuant to the Court's Order dated November 22, 2016. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Whitman, Johnston)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. The Court has received Lead Plaintiff's counsel's letter dated November 21, 2016. Dkt. No. 51. The Court directs Lead Plaintiffs counsel to provide the Court with a status update regarding service on the individual defendants in this matter no later than January 16, 2017 or seven days after the United States Central Authority transmits the complaint and related materials to the Brazilian Central Authority for service on the individual defendants, whichever is earlier. In light of the automatic stay of discovery imposed by 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(b)(3) and Defendant Banco Bradesco S.A.'s intention to file a motion to dismiss the complaint, the parties' obligation to submit a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order is stayed until further order of the Court. All parties who have appeared in this action are directed to submit the joint status letter described in the Court's August 22, 2016 order, Dkt. No. 25 no later than November 30, 2016 and to appear for the initial pretrial conference scheduled for December 7, 2016 at 4:00 p.m. The parties are further directed to submit a joint letter to the Court no later than November 28, 2016 stating the date on which the amended complaint was served on Defendant Banco Bradesco, S.A. and their views regarding the date by which Defendant Banco Bradesco, S.A. must answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3). Lead Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on Defendants and to retain proof of service. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/22/2016) (rjm)
November 21, 2016 Filing 51 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. dated November 21, 2016 re: Status Report on Service and Joint Request to Continue Parties Submission of Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Whitman, Johnston)
November 7, 2016 Filing 50 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu. (pc)
November 7, 2016 Filing 49 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Luiz Carlos Angelotti. (pc)
October 27, 2016 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alfred Louis Fatale, III on behalf of Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Fatale, Alfred)
October 21, 2016 Filing 47 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Luiz Carlos Angelotti, re: #45 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Zivitz, Andrew)
October 21, 2016 Filing 46 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, re: #45 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Zivitz, Andrew)
October 21, 2016 Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi, Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu, Luiz Carlos Angelotti with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by William Bryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zivitz, Andrew)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: The Court has received Lead Plaintiff's counsel's letter dated October 6, 2016. Dkt. No. 43. The Court directs Lead Plaintiff's counsel to provide the Court with a status update regarding service in this matter on or before November 21, 2016. Lead Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this order on defendants and to retain proof of service. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/12/2016) (kko)
October 6, 2016 Filing 43 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. dated October 6, 2016 re: status update regarding service of process. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Whitman, Johnston)
September 23, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Banco Bradesco S.A.. (Wolfe, Owen)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Margaret E. Onasch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Richard A. Russo, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Andrew L. Zivitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory)
September 21, 2016 Filing 38 MOTION for Margaret E. Onasch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12783619. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Onasch, Margaret)
September 21, 2016 Filing 37 MOTION for Richard A. Russo, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12783495. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Russo, Richard)
September 21, 2016 Filing 36 MOTION for Andrew L. Zivitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12783445. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Zivitz, Andrew)
September 21, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #36 MOTION for Andrew L. Zivitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12783445. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #38 MOTION for Margaret E. Onasch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12783619. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #37 MOTION for Richard A. Russo, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12783495. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 1, 2016 Filing 35 STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE, SCHEDULE AND CAPTION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties, that, subject to the Court's approval: Sullivan & Cromwell LLP will accept service of the Initial Complaint and summons on behalf of Defendant Banco Bradesco, without waiving any of its defenses or objections to the lawsuit; Defendant Banco Bradesco need not respond to the Initial Complaint; Lead Plaintiff will file an amended complaint on or before October 21, 2016; The caption in this action should be amended as follows: In re Banco Bradesco S.A. Securities Litigation, Civil No. 1:16-04155 (GHW). The Court does not accept the proposed briefing schedule for filing opposition and reply papers set forth in paragraphs 5 and 6. As required by the Court's individual Rules, if Banco Bradesco anticipates filing a motion to dismiss, it must first request a pre-motion conference with the Court. Any such request must be made at least two weeks in advance of the parties' stipulated date for the filing of the motion to dismiss. The briefing schedule for filing opposition and reply papers to that motion will be set by the Court at the pre-motion conference. (Amended Pleadings due by 10/21/2016.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/1/2016) (kko)
August 31, 2016 Filing 34 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Fundacao Bradesco, Corporate Parent Cidade de Deus Companhia Comercial Participacoes, Corporate Parent NCF Participacoes for Banco Bradesco S.A.. Document filed by Banco Bradesco S.A..(Pepperman, Richard)
August 31, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Richard C. Pepperman to RE-FILE Document #33 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
August 30, 2016 Filing 33 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Banco Bradesco S.A..(Pepperman, Richard) Modified on 8/31/2016 (lb).
August 30, 2016 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Owen Richard Wolfe on behalf of Banco Bradesco S.A.. (Wolfe, Owen)
August 30, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc De Leeuw on behalf of Banco Bradesco S.A.. (De Leeuw, Marc)
August 30, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard C. Pepperman, II on behalf of Banco Bradesco S.A.. (Pepperman, Richard)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: The Court has received Lead Plaintiff's counsel's letter dated August 25, 2016. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for October 6, 2016 is adjourned to December 7, 2016 at 4:00 p.m. The joint letter and proposed case management plan described in this Court's August 18, 2016 letter are due no later than November 30, 2016. This Court directs Lead Plaintiff's counsel to provide the Court with a status update regarding service in this matter on or before October 6, 2016. Lead Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this order on defendants and to retain proof of service. (Initial Conference set for 12/7/2016 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/25/2016) (kko)
August 25, 2016 Filing 28 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Johnston de F. Whitman, Jr. dated August 25, 2016 re: adjournment of the initial pretrial conference. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi.(Whitman, Johnston)
August 25, 2016 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Individual Rules of Practice served on Banco Bradesco, S.A. on 8/23/2016. Service was accepted by Raphaela Siqueira, Executive Secretary. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Whitman, Johnston)
August 25, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Johnston de Forest Whitman, Jr on behalf of Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Whitman, Johnston)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/6/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 12C, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods, and as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/22/2016) (rjm)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING THE MOTION OF PUBLIC EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF MISSISSIPPI FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF ITS SELECTION OF COUNSEL terminating #11 Motion to Appoint Counsel; terminating #11 Motion to Appoint; terminating #13 Motion to Appoint; terminating #13 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting #17 Motion to Appoint. Having considered the Motion of Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Counsel (the "Motion"), the Memorandum of Law and Declaration of Michael W. Stocker in support thereof, and good cause appearing therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Motion is GRANTED. Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(B), Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi is appointed to serve as Lead Plaintiff in the above-captioned action and any subsequently filed or transferred actions that relate to the above-captioned action. The law firm of Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP is hereby approved as Lead Counsel for the class. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions pending at Dkt. Nos. 11, 13, and 17. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/15/2016) (kko)
August 12, 2016 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #17 MOTION to Appoint Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and for Approval of Its Selection of Counsel. . Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Stocker, Michael)
August 12, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Lead Plaintiff Motion, Dkt. # 11 re: #11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rosen Law Firm. MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff.. Document filed by Louis Jean. (Kim, Phillip)
August 12, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE of NON-OPPOSITION TO COMPETING MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL re: #16 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #15 Declaration in Support of Motion,, #13 MOTION to Appoint Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Policemens Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, P.C.. Document filed by Policemens Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago, Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago. (Roseman, Robert)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. On August 2, 2016, members of the purported class in Bryan v. Branco Bradesco S.A., et al., 1:16-cv-4155, filed motions to serve as lead plaintiff in this action. Responses to the motions may be filed no later than August 12, 2016. Replies, if any, may be filed no later than August 17, 2016. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on August 5, 2016) (Text Only Order)(Woods, Gregory)
August 2, 2016 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Michael W. Stocker in Support re: #17 MOTION to Appoint Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and for Approval of Its Selection of Counsel.. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Loss Analysis, #3 Exhibit C - Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Kessler Topaz Firm Resume, #5 Exhibit E - Labaton Sucharow Firm Resume)(Stocker, Michael)
August 2, 2016 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Appoint Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and for Approval of Its Selection of Counsel. . Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Stocker, Michael)
August 2, 2016 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and for Approval of Its Selection of Counsel. Document filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stocker, Michael)
August 2, 2016 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 MOTION to Appoint Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Policemens Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, P.C. . Document filed by Policemens Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago, Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago. (Roseman, Robert)
August 2, 2016 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Robert M. Roseman in Support re: #13 MOTION to Appoint Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Policemens Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, P.C.. Document filed by Policemens Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago, Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Roseman, Robert)
August 2, 2016 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #16 Memorandum) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rosen Law Firm. MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff., #13 MOTION to Appoint Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Policemens Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, P.C. . Document filed by Policemens Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago, Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago. (Roseman, Robert) Modified on 8/3/2016 (db).
August 2, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Policemens Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, P.C. Document filed by Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago, Policemens Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago.(Roseman, Robert)
August 2, 2016 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rosen Law Firm. MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. . Document filed by Louis Jean. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kim, Phillip)
August 2, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rosen Law Firm., MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. Document filed by Louis Jean. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Phillip)
June 6, 2016 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alexandre Da Silva Gluher. (pc)
June 6, 2016 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Banco Bradesco S.A.. (pc)
June 6, 2016 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Julio De Siqueira Carvalho Araujo. (pc)
June 6, 2016 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi. (pc)
June 6, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Phillip C. Kim. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: William Bryan. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pc)
June 6, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Phillip C. Kim to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The civil cover sheet does not have a second page. (pc)
June 6, 2016 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 6, 2016 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. (pc)
June 6, 2016 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 3, 2016 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALEXANDRE DA SILVA GLHER, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by William Bryan(individually), William Bryan(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Kim, Phillip)
June 3, 2016 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JULIO DE SIQUEIRA CARVALHO DE ARAUJO, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by William Bryan(individually), William Bryan(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Kim, Phillip)
June 3, 2016 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LUIZ CARLOS TRABUCO CAPPI, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by William Bryan(individually), William Bryan(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Kim, Phillip)
June 3, 2016 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Banco Bradesco S.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by William Bryan(individually), William Bryan(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Kim, Phillip)
June 3, 2016 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kim, Phillip) Modified on 6/6/2016 (pc).
June 3, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Julio De Siqueira Carvalho Araujo, Banco Bradesco S.A., Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi, Alexandre Da Silva Gluher. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12378005)Document filed by William Bryan, William Bryan. (Attachments: #1 certification)(Kim, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Banco Bradesco S.A. Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Bradesco S.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domingos Figueiredo de Abreu
Represented By: Marina Miller
Represented By: Tina Gonzalez Barton
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Represented By: Marc De Leeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio De Siqueira Carvalho Araujo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandre Da Silva Gluher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luiz Carlos Trabuco Cappi
Represented By: Marina Miller
Represented By: Tina Gonzalez Barton
Represented By: Alana Mary Longmoore
Represented By: Rachel Stephanie Harris
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Represented By: Marc De Leeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luiz Carlos Angelotti
Represented By: Marina Miller
Represented By: Tina Gonzalez Barton
Represented By: Alana Mary Longmoore
Represented By: Rachel Stephanie Harris
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Represented By: Marc De Leeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Bradesco S.A.
Represented By: Owen Richard Wolfe
Represented By: Marina Miller
Represented By: Tina Gonzalez Barton
Represented By: Alana Mary Longmoore
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Represented By: Rachel Stephanie Harris
Represented By: Marc De Leeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust
Represented By: Jonathan Gardner
Represented By: Alfred Louis Fatale, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bryan
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Policemens Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago
Represented By: Robert Mark Roseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Louis Jean
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago
Represented By: Robert Mark Roseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi
Represented By: Andrew L Zivitz
Represented By: Richard A Russo, Jr
Represented By: James P. McEvilly, III
Represented By: Jonathan Gardner
Represented By: Margaret E. Mazzeo
Represented By: Jason Matthew Kirschberg
Represented By: Johnston de Forest Whitman, Jr
Represented By: Michael Walter Stocker
Represented By: Alfred Louis Fatale, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?