Dennis et al v. JPMorgan Chase & Co. et al
Plaintiff: Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd., Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P. and Orange County Employees Retirement System
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Australia, BNP Paribas, Australia Branch, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, LLoyds Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings plc, Credit Suisse Group AG, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, Citibank N.A., Australia Branch, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, UBS AG, Citibank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & Co., ICAP plc, Deutsche Bank AG, Macquarie Group Ltd., Bank of New Zealand, UBS AG, Australia Branch, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, Australia Branch, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, Tullett Prebon PLC, Credit Suisse AG, Citigroup Inc., The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., Macquarie Bank Ltd., John Does Nos. 1-50, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Australia Branch, Lloyds Banking Group plc, Westpac Banking Corporation, Deutsche Bank AG, Australia Branch, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Morgan Stanley, Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Australia and BNP Paribas, S.A.
Case Number: 1:2016cv06496
Filed: August 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Gabriel W Gorenstein
Referring Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. A.B. Data, Ltd. is hereby appointed as Settlement Administrator for purposes of the Settlement. 2. The Settlement Administrator is directed to establish and maintain a Settlement website, www.BBSWSettlement.com, as soon as practicable. 3. The form of the preliminary notice submitted by Class Counsel in connection with the July 31 Report is hereby approved. The preliminary notice shall be posted on the Settlement website as soon as practicable. 4. Class Counsel shall submit a further report to the Court on or before December 16, 2019 advising the Court of the status of class notice discovery, proposing the next steps in class notice, and addressing whether deferral of notice of the Settlement may be appropriate. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 8/27/2019) (ama)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute; DI # 329 - Letter dated 7/31/2019. Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 8/21/2019) (jca)
August 22, 2019 Filing 330 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
August 21, 2019 Filing 329 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Vincent Briganti and Christopher Lovell dated 7/31/2019 re: Pursuant to the Court's 1/16/2019 order (DI 265) to 1) update the court on the ongoing discovery effors concerning potential Class members' names and addresses, 2) move for the appointment of A.B. Data, Ltd. as settlement administrator and for leave to establish a settlement website and post a preliminary Settlement notice on the settlement website, and 3) request the Court direct Class Counsel to submit a further status report to the Court on or before 12/16/2019 to advise the Court, after the ongoing discovery is substantialy completed, whether it is appropriate to defer sending notice of the settlement. Document filed by Richard Dennis.(Mohan, Andrew)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting #323 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document. Granted nunc pro tunc. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 8/17/2019) (jca) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
August 7, 2019 Filing 327 DECLARATION of Kenneth I. Schacter in Support re: #303 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Unredacted copy of the ISDA agreement)(Schacter, Kenneth)
August 7, 2019 Filing 326 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #303 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited. (Schacter, Kenneth)
August 7, 2019 Filing 325 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #306 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by RBC Capital Markets LLC. (Fishman, Marshall)
August 7, 2019 Filing 324 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #298 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, UBS AG, Westpac Banking Corporation. (Januszewski, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 323 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David G. Januszewski dated August 7, 2019. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, UBS AG, Westpac Banking Corporation.(Januszewski, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 322 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David Januszewski dated August 1, 2019. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG.(Januszewski, David)
July 17, 2019 Filing 321 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER: granting #319 Motion to Seal Document. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Part I Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/12/2019) (ama) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
July 11, 2019 Filing 319 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Vincent Briganti dated July 11, 2019. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Orange County Employees Retirement System, Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd..(Briganti, Vincent)
July 9, 2019 Filing 318 DECLARATION of Roland R. St. Louis, III in Opposition re: #303 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Orange County Employees Retirement System, Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(St. Louis, Roland)
July 8, 2019 Filing 317 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #298 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Orange County Employees Retirement System, Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Briganti, Vincent)
July 8, 2019 Filing 316 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #261 MOTION for Discovery . . Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Orange County Employees Retirement System, Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Briganti, Vincent)
July 8, 2019 Filing 315 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #306 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Orange County Employees Retirement System, Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Briganti, Vincent)
July 8, 2019 Filing 314 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #303 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Orange County Employees Retirement System, Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Briganti, Vincent)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER granting #312 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/25/2019) (Kaplan, Lewis)
June 25, 2019 Filing 312 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Vincent Briganti dated June 25, 2019. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Orange County Employees Retirement System, Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd..(Briganti, Vincent)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 311 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #275 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney Francis John Acott terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/17/2019) (jca)
May 23, 2019 Filing 310 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER granting #297 Motion to Seal Document. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/21/2019) (ne)
May 20, 2019 Filing 308 DECLARATION of Chris Walmsley in Support re: #306 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by RBC Capital Markets LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consolidated Statement of Financial Condition as of October 31, 2018)(Fishman, Marshall)
May 20, 2019 Filing 307 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #306 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by RBC Capital Markets LLC. (Fishman, Marshall)
May 20, 2019 Filing 306 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by RBC Capital Markets LLC.(Fishman, Marshall)
May 20, 2019 Filing 305 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #261 MOTION for Discovery . . Document filed by HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited. (Porpora, Matthew)
May 20, 2019 Filing 304 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #303 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited. (Roellke, Jon)
May 20, 2019 Filing 303 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited.(Roellke, Jon)
May 20, 2019 Filing 302 DECLARATION of Brian James Maddigan in Support re: #298 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shane, Penny)
May 20, 2019 Filing 301 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #298 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, UBS AG, Westpac Banking Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Second Amended Class Action Complaint)(Januszewski, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 300 DECLARATION of Nowell D. Bamberger in Support re: #298 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, UBS AG, Westpac Banking Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal)(Januszewski, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 299 DECLARATION of David G. Januszewski in Support re: #298 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, UBS AG, Westpac Banking Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Julie Lauck (BNPPSA), #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Mark Robert Alexander (CBA), #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Daniel Klay (CSAG), #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Joseph P. Randazzo (DBAG), #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Stela C. Tipi (DBAG), #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Mark Chambers (HSBC Holdings), #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Robert Agati (HBAU), #8 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Paul Bradley Szalajko (MS Australia), #9 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Louise Thomson (NAB), #10 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Paul Serritella (RBC), #11 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of William Gougherty (RBSG, RBS, RBS N.V., RBSGAPL), #12 Exhibit 12 - Declaration of John Connors (UBSAG), #13 Exhibit 13 - Declaration of of David Alexander McLean (Westpac Banking Corporation), #14 Exhibit 14 - ABN Subpoena)(Januszewski, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 298 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, UBS AG, Westpac Banking Corporation.(Januszewski, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 297 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David G. Januszewski dated May 20, 2019. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, UBS AG, Westpac Banking Corporation.(Januszewski, David)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting #293 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages /seeking leave to file a single joint memorandum of law of up to 50 pages in support of Defendants' motions to dismiss. Granted - though brevity remains the soul of wit. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/16/2019) (jca)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #294 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney Lee Jason Lefkowitz terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/16/2019) (jca)
May 15, 2019 Filing 294 MOTION for Lee J. Lefkowitz to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd..(Briganti, Vincent)
May 14, 2019 Filing 293 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages /seeking leave to file a single joint memorandum of law of up to 50 pages in support of Defendants' motions to dismiss addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David G. Januszewski dated May 14, 2019. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, UBS AG, Westpac Banking Corporation.(Januszewski, David)
April 22, 2019 Filing 292 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Benjamin Andrew Fleming on behalf of Lloyds Banking Group plc. New Address: Hogan Lovells US LLP, 390 Madison Avenue, New York, New York, United States 10017, 212 918-3000. (Fleming, Benjamin)
April 22, 2019 Filing 291 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lisa Jean Fried on behalf of Lloyds Banking Group plc. New Address: Hogan Lovells US LLP, 390 Madison Avenue, New York, New York, United States 10017, 212 918-3000. (Fried, Lisa)
April 22, 2019 Filing 290 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Marc Joel Gottridge on behalf of Lloyds Banking Group plc. New Address: Hogan Lovells US LLP, 390 Madison Avenue, New York, New York, United States 10017, 212 918-3000. (Gottridge, Marc)
April 22, 2019 Filing 289 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Marc Joel Gottridge on behalf of Lloyds Banking Group plc. New Address: Hogan Lovells US LLP, 390 Madison Avenue, New York, New York, United States 10017, 212 918-3000. (Gottridge, Marc)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #287 Motion for Carl Hammarskjold to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/22/2019) (jca)
April 18, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #287 MOTION for Carl Hammarskjold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16723900. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
April 18, 2019 Filing 287 MOTION for Carl Hammarskjold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16723900. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Orange County Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammarskjold, Carl)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #284 Motion for Todd A. Seaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/17/2019) (jca)
April 16, 2019 Filing 285 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher Lovell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson LLP, 500 5th Avenue, Suite 2440, New York, New York (NY), U.S.A 10110, 2126081900. (Lovell, Christopher)
April 16, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #284 MOTION for Todd A. Seaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16699748. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 15, 2019 Filing 284 MOTION for Todd A. Seaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16699748. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Orange County Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Seaver, Todd)
April 9, 2019 Filing 283 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Thomas Egan on behalf of Orange County Employees Retirement System. (Egan, Patrick)
April 5, 2019 Filing 282 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
April 3, 2019 Filing 281 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #63 Amended Complaint,,,,,, against Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., ICAP plc, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., John Does Nos. 1-50, LLoyds Bank PLC, Lloyds Banking Group plc, Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon PLC, UBS AG, Westpac Banking Corporation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., Orange County Employees Retirement System. Related document: #63 Amended Complaint,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Briganti, Vincent)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting #279 LETTER Motion to Seal Document. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/2/2019) (jca) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
April 1, 2019 Filing 279 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document #277 Stipulation and Order,,,, addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Vincent Briganti dated April 1, 2019. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd..(Briganti, Vincent)
March 14, 2019 Filing 278 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher Martin Paparella on behalf of Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd.. New Address: Steptoe & Johnson LLP, 1114 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York, United States 10036, 212-506-3900. (Paparella, Christopher)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND FILE THE PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the Stipulating Plaintiffs and the Stipulating Defendants: That Stipulating Plaintiffs may file the PSAC on the Court's docket as the Second Amended Class Action Complaint ("SAC"); The schedule set by the Court on January 24, 2019 for responding to the Motions is vacated, and the following schedule will apply as to the Stipulating Defendants' motion to dismiss the PSAC and opposition to the Discovery Motion: a. Stipulating Defendants will file any motion(s) to dismiss the SAC or opposition(s) to the Discovery Motion forty-five (45) days after the date on which the Stipulating Plaintiffs file the SAC on the Court's docket; and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/4/2019) (jca)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 276 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND FILE THE PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among Plaintiffs, OCERS and the Stipulating Defendants, and ORDERED by the Court: 1. To the extent Plaintiffs are permitted to file the PSAC as a result of the Court "so ordering" the Separate Stipulation, and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/4/2019) (jca)
February 22, 2019 Filing 275 MOTION for Francis John Acott to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Gluckow, Paul)
February 21, 2019 Filing 274 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, UBS AG, Westpac Banking Corporation. (Porpora, Matthew)
February 21, 2019 Filing 273 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by LLoyds Bank PLC, Lloyds Banking Group plc. (Fleming, Benjamin)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from 2/19/2019 dated 2/19/2019 re: We respectfully request that the Court so-order the Notice of Withdrawal so that Mr. Fraser's appearance may be terminated on the docket of this matter. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED., Attorney Brian S. Fraser terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/20/2019) (jca)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 271 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND FILE THE PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: IT rs HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs, OCERS and the Stipulating Defendants, and ORDERED by the Court: 1. To the extent Plaintiffs are permitted to file the PSAC (either as a result of a stipulation between the parties remaining in the case or an order by the Court): a. The Court's Opinions shall be deemed to apply to OCERS' claims against the Stipulating Defendants in the PSAC; b. Accordingly, OCERS' claims against the Stipulating Defendants in the PSAC shall be, and hereby are dismissed, for the same reasons set forth in the Opinions; c. No Stipulating Defendant shall be considered a defendant in the action, nor shall any of them have any obligation to respond to the PSAC and/or otherwise participate as a defendant in the action while it is pending in this Court unless and until Plaintiffs move the Court for an order reinstating one or more claims against the Stipulating Defendants and the Court issues such an order (a "Reinstatement Order"); as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/28/2019) (mro)
January 25, 2019 Filing 270 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., ICAP plc, Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon PLC. (Brandt, Shari)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND AND MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows: 1. The time to respond to the Motion to Amend is extended to and includes March 1, 2019. 2. The time to respond to the Discovery Motion is extended to and includes March 1, 2019, and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 3/1/2019) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/24/2019) (jca)
January 23, 2019 Filing 268 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
January 22, 2019 Filing 267 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., ICAP plc, LLoyds Bank PLC, Lloyds Banking Group plc, Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon PLC, UBS AG, Westpac Banking Corporation. (Porpora, Matthew)
January 17, 2019 Filing 266 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Vincent Briganti and Christopher Lovell dated 1/15/2019 re: As counsel for Plaintiffs, we submit the enclosed proposed order ("Proposed Order") for your consideration, as directed in your order dated November 28, 2018 (ECF No. 229) granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Conditional Class Certification for purposes of Class Action Settlement with Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. ("JPMorgan"). JPMorgan consents to the Proposed Order, which will also be filed via ECF. We write this letter to provide you additional information as to the timing and substance of the Proposed Order. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.(jca)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER CONCERNING NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND NOTICE OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. AND JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs are directed forthwith to issue subpoenas duces tecum upon such futures commission merchants, banks, brokers and exchanges as necessary to identify Class members for purposes of giving notice. Names and addresses of Class members so identified shall be kept confidential by Class Counsel for use in this action and for no other purpose, and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/16/2019) (jca)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting #259 Motion to Seal Document. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/16/2019) (ks) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
January 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #258 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
January 15, 2019 Filing 263 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #260 MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Amended Complaint,,,,,, . . Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Briganti, Vincent)
January 15, 2019 Filing 262 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #261 MOTION for Discovery . . Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Briganti, Vincent)
January 15, 2019 Filing 261 MOTION for Discovery . Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd..(Briganti, Vincent)
January 15, 2019 Filing 260 MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Amended Complaint,,,,,, . Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd..(Briganti, Vincent)
January 15, 2019 Filing 259 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Vincent Briganti dated January 15, 2019. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd..(Briganti, Vincent)
January 15, 2019 Filing 258 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. Related Document Number: #229 . (Briganti, Vincent) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting #256 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney Alexander Nuo Li terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/10/2019) (jca)
January 9, 2019 Filing 256 MOTION for Alexander Nuo Li to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Gluckow, Paul)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #238 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying #240 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying #242 Motion for Reconsideration. The motions [DI 238, DI 240, DI 242] each are denied in all respects.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/20/2018) (jca)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 254 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO SEEK LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO RENEW THEIR REQUEST FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows: 1. Plaintiffs' time to seek leave to file an amended complaint and to renew their request for jurisdictional discovery is extended twenty (20) days to and including January 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/20/2018) (jca)
December 17, 2018 Filing 253 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Lovell, Christopher)
December 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Notice to attorney Christopher Lovell to RE-FILE Document No. #252 Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the proposed order; Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Stipulation and Order found under the event list Proposed Orders. - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) and dated PDF. (dt)
December 17, 2018 Filing 252 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. Related Document Number: #227 . (Lovell, Christopher) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 12/17/2018 (dt).
December 17, 2018 Filing 251 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file an amended complaint and serve personal jurisidiction discovery requests addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Christopher Lovell and Vincent Briganti dated December 17, 2018. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lovell, Christopher)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING OF RECONSIDERATION MOTIONS: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows: 1. The time for Plaintiffs and Stipulating Defendants to file opposition memoranda, if any, to the Reconsideration Motions is extended to January 15, 2019. 2. The time for Plaintiffs, RBC Capital Markets LLC, and Morgan Stanley to file reply memoranda in support of their respective Reconsideration Motions is extended to January 29, 2019. 3. No defense of any of the Stipulating Defendants to the claims in the Action, including without limitation defenses based upon lack of personal or subject matter jurisdiction, lack of standing, lack of capacity, improper venue or a defendant having been improperly named, is prejudiced or waived by the execution of, agreement to or filing of this stipulation.4. This stipulation may be executed in separate counterparts, and counterparts may be executed in facsimile or.pdf form, each of which shall be deemed an original. This stipulation, once fully executed, may be submitted to the Court without further notice to any party. (Responses due by 1/15/2019, Replies due by 1/29/2019.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/14/2018) (kv)
December 13, 2018 Filing 249 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., ICAP plc, LLoyds Bank PLC, Lloyds Banking Group plc, Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon PLC, UBS AG, Westpac Banking Corporation. (Januszewski, David)
December 12, 2018 Filing 248 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate CME Group, Inc., Other Affiliate NEX International Limited for ICAP plc. Document filed by ICAP plc.(Gaither, H.)
December 11, 2018 Filing 247 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR MORGAN STANLEY TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendant's time to answer the First Amended Complaint, if required, is extended until fourteen (14) days from the date that the Court enters a decision with respect to Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the First Amended Complaint, but in no event sooner than January 20, 2019. In the event that the Court grants Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the First Amended Complaint, Defendant is not required to answer the First Amended Complaint. Defendant has not requested any previous extensions of time to answer the First Amended Complaint. This stipulation may be executed in separate counterparts, and counterparts may be executed by facsimile or.pdf form, each of which shall be deemed an original. This stipulation, once executed, may be submitted to the Court without further notice of any party. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Part One Judge William H. Pauley on 12/11/2018) (jca)
December 11, 2018 Filing 246 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING MATERIALS PRODUCED BY JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. AND JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A....regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Part One Judge William H. Pauley on 12/11/2018) (jca)
December 11, 2018 Filing 245 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR MACQUARIE GROUP LTD. AND MACQUARIE BANK LTD. TO FILE THEIR MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendant Macquarie's time to file any Motion for Reconsideration is extended so as to be due within two weeks of the Court's decision on Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the First Amended Complaint. This stipulation may be executed in separate counterparts, and counterparts may be executed by facsimile or .pdf form, each of which shall be deemed an original. This stipulation, once executed, may be submitted to the Court without further notice of any party. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Part One Judge William H. Pauley on 12/11/2018) (jca)
December 11, 2018 Filing 244 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Margaret Ciavarella MacLean on behalf of Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (MacLean, Margaret)
December 10, 2018 Filing 243 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #242 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #227 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,,, . . Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Briganti, Vincent)
December 10, 2018 Filing 242 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #227 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,,, . Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd..(Briganti, Vincent)
December 10, 2018 Filing 241 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #240 MOTION for Reconsideration . . Document filed by Morgan Stanley. (Schacter, Kenneth)
December 10, 2018 Filing 240 MOTION for Reconsideration . Document filed by Morgan Stanley.(Schacter, Kenneth)
December 10, 2018 Filing 239 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #238 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #227 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,,, (Motion for Clarification or, in the Alternative, Reconsideration of the Court's Opinion Resolving Defendants' Motions). . Document filed by RBC Capital Markets LLC. (Fishman, Marshall)
December 10, 2018 Filing 238 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #227 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,,, (Motion for Clarification or, in the Alternative, Reconsideration of the Court's Opinion Resolving Defendants' Motions). Document filed by RBC Capital Markets LLC.(Fishman, Marshall)
December 10, 2018 Filing 237 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd.. (Paparella, Christopher)
December 7, 2018 Filing 236 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Horn, Geoffrey)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 235 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR RBC CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendant RBC Capital Markets' time to Answer the First Amended Complaint, if required, is extended until fourteen (14) days from the date that the Court enters a decision with respect to Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the First Amended Complaint, but in no event sooner than January 20, 2019. In the event that the Court grants Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the First Amended Complaint, Defendant RBC Capital Markets is not required to Answer the First Amended Complaint. Defendant RBC Capital Markets has not requested any previous extensions of time to Answer the First Amended Complaint. This stipulation may be executed in separate counterparts, and counterparts may be executed by facsimile or.pdf form, each of which shall be deemed an original. This stipulation, once executed, may be submitted to the Court without further notice of any party. SO ORDERED. (RBC Capital Markets LLC answer due 1/20/2019.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken, Part I on 12/7/2018) (anc)
December 7, 2018 Filing 234 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Morgan Stanley. (Schacter, Kenneth)
December 7, 2018 Filing 233 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth M. Zito on behalf of RBC Capital Markets LLC. (Zito, Elizabeth)
December 6, 2018 Filing 232 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by RBC Capital Markets LLC. (Sama, Christine)
December 5, 2018 Filing 231 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Nowell D. Bamberger on behalf of HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc. New Address: Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP, 2112 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20037, (202) 974-1500. (Bamberger, Nowell)
November 30, 2018 Filing 230 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Isaac Martin Rethy on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Rethy, Isaac)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER GRANTING CONDITIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION FOR PURPOSES OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. AND JPMORGAN CHASE BANK. N.A. granting #223 Motion for Settlement. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: For purposes of settlement only, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(a) and (6)(3), the Court hereby certifies a Settlement Class consisting of all Persons (other than those Persons who timely and validly request exclusion from the Settlement Class in accordance with the requirements set forth herein) who purchased, sold, held, traded, or otherwise had any interest in BBSW-Based Derivatives during period January 1, 2003 through December 31, 2012 ("Class Period"), provided that, if Representative Plaintiffs expand the Class in any subsequent amended complaint, class motion, or settlement, the defined Class in this Agreement shall be expanded so as to be coterminous with such expansion. Excluded from the Settlement Class are the Defendants (as defined in the Settlement Agreement) and any parent, subsidiary, affiliate or agent of any Defendant or any co- conspirator whether or not named as a Defendant, and the United States Government; and as further set forth herein. The timing, plan, and forms of the Class Notice to the Settlement Class and the date of the Fairness Hearing before this Court to consider any member(s) of the Settlement Class's objections to final approval of the Settlement and to consider the fairness, adequacy and reasonableness of the proposed Settlement and Settlement Agreement shall all be determined by separate order of this Court. The parties shall submit a proposed order on or before 1/15/19. The Court's conditional certification of the Settlement Class and appointment of Representative Plaintiffs as class representatives, as provided herein is without prejudice to, or waiver of, the rights of any Defendant to contest any other request by Representative Plaintiffs to certify a class. The Court's findings in this Conditional Certification Order shall have no effect on the Court's ruling on any motion to certify any class in this litigation, or appoint class representatives, and no party may cite or refer to the Court's approval of the Settlement Class as binding or persuasive authority with respect to any motion to certify such class or appoint class representatives. 17. The Clerk shall terminate DI 223. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/28/2018) (anc) Modified on 12/3/2018 (anc).
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Defendants' motion is granted. The claims brought by Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., and FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P. are dismissed as to all defendants except JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/26/2018) (anc)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 227 OPINION re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by RBS N.V. et al. #132 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint filed by RBS N.V. et al. Defendants' motions to dismiss each are granted in part and denied in part, as follows: A. The motion to dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction and failure to state a claim [DI 132] is granted (except as to defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.) to the following extent: (1) All claims brought by plaintiffs FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P. and FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P. are dismissed; (2) Plaintiffs do not have class standing to assert claims for breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing or unjust enrichment on behalf of purported class members to the extent such class members traded in BBSW-based forward rate agreements and 90-day BAB futures; (3) The CEA claims brought by FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. are dismissed; (4) The remaining CEA and RICO Act claims are dismissed as to defendants Deutsche Bank AG, Royal Bank of Canada, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Lloyds Banking Group plc, Lloyds Bank plc, Macquarie Group Ltd., Macquarie Bank Ltd., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, ICAP plc, ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon plc, and Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd.; (5) The claims of breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing and unjust enrichment are dismissed as to all defendants except Macquarie Bank Ltd., Morgan Stanley, and Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, and The motion [DI 132] is denied in all other respects. B. The motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and improper venue [DI 109] is granted in all respects except that it is denied as to the claims brought by FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P. against defendant Macquarie Bank Ltd. C. Plaintiffs' request for jurisdictional discovery is denied without prejudice to their renewing such request within thirty (30) days after the date of entry hereof. Any motion for leave to amend must be made no later than thirty (30) days after the date of entry hereof. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/26/2018) (anc) Modified on 11/29/2018 (anc).
November 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #226 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
November 21, 2018 Filing 226 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. Related Document Number: #223 . (Briganti, Vincent) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
November 21, 2018 Filing 225 DECLARATION of Vincent Briganti and Christopher Lovell in Support re: #223 MOTION for Settlement Conditional Class Certification for Purposes of Class Action Settlement.. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Briganti, Vincent)
November 21, 2018 Filing 224 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #223 MOTION for Settlement Conditional Class Certification for Purposes of Class Action Settlement. . Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Briganti, Vincent)
November 21, 2018 Filing 223 MOTION for Settlement Conditional Class Certification for Purposes of Class Action Settlement. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd..(Briganti, Vincent)
September 26, 2018 Filing 222 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charity Eunah Lee on behalf of HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc. (Lee, Charity)
May 11, 2018 Filing 221 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Thomas Menitove on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Menitove, Jonathan)
March 23, 2018 Filing 220 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
March 22, 2018 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #219 Order on Motion to Seal Document to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (rjm)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting #218 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document Forthcoming Reply Brief addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Penny Shane dated March 20, 2018. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd. Granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/22/2018) (rjm).
March 20, 2018 Filing 218 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document Forthcoming Reply Brief addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Penny Shane dated March 20, 2018. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd..(Shane, Penny)
March 13, 2018 Filing 217 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting #214 Motion to Seal Document. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/13/2018) (mro)
March 12, 2018 Filing 215 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sitso W. Bediako on behalf of Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Bediako, Sitso)
March 6, 2018 Filing 214 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Vincent Briganti dated March 6, 2018. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd..(Briganti, Vincent)
February 23, 2018 Filing 213 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting #210 Motion to Seal Document. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/22/2018) (anc)
February 21, 2018 Filing 211 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #209 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Thomas C. Rice terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/21/2018) (kgo)
February 21, 2018 Filing 210 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Forthcoming Brief addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Penny Shane dated February 21, 2018. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd..(Shane, Penny)
February 14, 2018 Filing 209 MOTION for Thomas C. Rice to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Gluckow, Paul)
February 5, 2018 Filing 208 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Penny Shane dated 2/2/18 re: Defendants propose the following briefing schedule: opening submissions by Defendants: 2/23/18; opposition submissions by Plaintiffs: 3/13/18 and reply submissions by Defendants: 3/23/18. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. ( Motions due by 2/23/2018., Responses due by 3/13/2018, Replies due by 3/23/2018.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/5/2018) (mro)
February 5, 2018 Filing 207 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Vince Briganti and Christopher Lovell dated 2/2/2018 re: Consistent with Your Honor's remarks at the January 23, 2018 hearing, Plaintiffs believe that Defendants' affirmative defense of capacity to sue (assuming it has not already been waived) is best suited for resolution after the Court rules on Defendants' pending motions to dismiss. See Jan. 23, 2018 Hr'g Tr. at 4:21 -22 ("[Y]ou may want to see how this all comes out before going forward with any more litigation on that issue.").(anc)
January 31, 2018 Filing 206 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a argument proceeding held on 1/23/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 31, 2018 Filing 205 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: argument held on 1/23/2018 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/21/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 30, 2018 Filing 204 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a argument proceeding held on 1/23/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 30, 2018 Filing 203 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: argument held on 1/23/2018 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE granting #201 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Attorney Peter Sullivan terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/19/2018) (anc)
January 18, 2018 Filing 201 MOTION for Peter Sullivan to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by UBS AG.(Sullivan, Peter)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER: The matter is before the Court on defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and improper venue [DI 109] and defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and failure to state a claim [DI 132]. The parties shall appear before the Court for oral argument on January 23, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. SO ORDERED.(Oral Argument set for 1/23/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/22/2017) (anc)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY UNDER SEAL denying #195 Motion for Leave to File Document. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/28/2017) (anc)
November 29, 2017 Filing 198 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
November 28, 2017 Filing 197 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
November 28, 2017 Filing 196 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #195 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Under Seal. . Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Briganti, Vincent)
November 28, 2017 Filing 195 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Under Seal. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Sur-Reply Under Seal)(Briganti, Vincent)
November 21, 2017 Filing 194 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting #192 Motion to Seal Document. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero Part I on 11/21/2017) (kgo)
November 20, 2017 Filing 192 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document Forthcoming Reply Brief addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Penny Shane dated November 20, 2017. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd..(Shane, Penny)
November 17, 2017 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #191 Endorsed Letter to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (anc)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Vince Briganti dated 11/16/2017 re: Accordingly, we enclose courtesy copies of the replacement pages for Exhibits C and D as well as a replacement CD with the complete corrected filing. Further, we ask the Court to endorse this letter to allow the Sealed Records Clerk to accept a replacement CD containing Plaintiffs' complete submission, including replacement Exhibits C and D, under seal. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/17/2017) (anc)
November 14, 2017 Filing 190 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #188 Motion to Seal Document. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/13/2017) (anc)
November 9, 2017 Filing 188 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Vincent Briganti dated November 9, 2017. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd..(Briganti, Vincent)
October 31, 2017 Filing 187 DECLARATION of David Januszewski in Support re: #132 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John Michael Harris)(Januszewski, David)
October 31, 2017 Filing 186 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #132 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Foreign Law Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 44.1, #2 Declaration of Penny Shane, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Shane, Penny)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting #184 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/20/2017) (Kaplan, Lewis)
October 19, 2017 Filing 184 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Motion to Dismiss on behalf of 29 Defendants addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Penny Shane dated October 19, 2017. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd..(Shane, Penny)
October 3, 2017 Filing 183 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Emily Phillips on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Phillips, Sarah)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #142 Motion for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/22/2017) (anc)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting #180 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Attorney Omari Largos Royter Mason terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/22/2017) (anc)
September 20, 2017 Filing 180 MOTION for Omari Largos Royter Mason to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Gluckow, Paul)
September 5, 2017 Filing 179 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Beth Forshaw on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Forshaw, Mary Beth)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #177 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Granted. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/22/2017) (mro)
June 22, 2017 Filing 177 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Declaration of Edward Kroub in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss with Corrected Exhibits addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Edward Y. Kroub dated June 22, 2017. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kroub Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A pt. 1 to Kroub Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A pt.2 to Kroub Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Kroub Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C pt. 1 to Kroub Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C pt. 2 to Kroub Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D to Kroub Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E to Kroub Declaration)(Kroub, Edward)
June 5, 2017 Filing 176 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Roland Raymond St. Louis, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Lowey Dannenberg, P.C., 44 South Broadway, Suite 1100, White Plains, NY, United States 10601, 914-997-0500. (St. Louis, Roland)
June 5, 2017 Filing 175 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lee Jason Lefkowitz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Lowey Dannenberg, P.C., 44 South Broadway, Suite 1100, White Plains, NY, United States 10601, 914-997-0500. (Lefkowitz, Lee)
June 5, 2017 Filing 174 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christian Levis on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Lowey Dannenberg, P.C., 44 South Broadway, Suite 1100, White Plains, NY, United States 10601, 914-997-0500. (Levis, Christian)
June 5, 2017 Filing 173 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Raymond Peter Girnys on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Lowey Dannenberg, P.C., 44 South Broadway, Suite 1100, White Plains, NY, United States 10601, 914-997-0500. (Girnys, Raymond)
June 5, 2017 Filing 172 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Peter Dexter St. Phillip, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Lowey Dannenberg, P.C., 44 South Broadway, Suite 1100, White Plains, NY, United States 10601, 914-997-0500. (St. Phillip, Peter)
June 2, 2017 Filing 171 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Vincent Briganti on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Lowey Dannenberg, P.C., 44 South Broadway, Suite 1100, White Plains, NY, United States 10601, 914-997-0500. (Briganti, Vincent)
June 2, 2017 Filing 170 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Geoffrey Milbank Horn on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Lowey Dannenberg, P.C., 44 South Broadway, Suite 1100, White Plains, NY, United States 10601, 914-997-0500. (Horn, Geoffrey)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #167 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. So Ordered. (Attorney Emma P. Simson terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/31/17) (yv)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) NOTICE OF PARTIAL VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO BNP PARIBAS, AUSTRALIA BRANCH; DEUTSCHE BANK AG, AUSTRALIA BRANCH; JP ORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. AUSTRALIA BRANCH; LLOYDS TSB BANK PLC, AUSTRALIA; ROYAL BANK OF CANADA, AUSTRALIA BRANCH; and UBS AG, AUSTRALIA BRANCH WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs Richard Dennis, Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., and FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., hereby give Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants (1) BNP Paribas, Australia Branch; (2) Deutsche Bank AG, Australia Branch; (3) JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Australia Branch; (4) Lloyds TSB Bank plc, Australia; (5) Royal Bank of Canada, Australia Branch; and (6) UBS AG,Australia Branch from the above-captioned action, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, without prejudice and without costs as to any party against any other. So ordered. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Australia Branch, Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Australia, Royal Bank of Canada, Australia Branch, UBS AG, Australia Branch, BNP Paribas, Australia Branch and Deutsche Bank AG, Australia Branch terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/31/2017) (rjm)
May 30, 2017 Filing 167 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Emma P. Simson to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Withdraw, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Simson, Emma) Modified on 7/31/2017 (ldi).
May 25, 2017 Filing 166 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #132 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., ICAP plc, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., LLoyds Bank PLC, Lloyds Banking Group plc, Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon PLC, UBS AG, Westpac Banking Corporation. (Braff, David)
May 25, 2017 Filing 165 DECLARATION of Adam S. Mintz in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 Order)(Januszewski, David)
May 25, 2017 Filing 164 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. . Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., ICAP plc, LLoyds Bank PLC, Lloyds Banking Group plc, Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd., Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon PLC, UBS AG, Westpac Banking Corporation. (Januszewski, David)
May 25, 2017 Filing 163 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #132 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited. (Januszewski, David)
May 25, 2017 Filing 162 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Shawn Mintz on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG. (Mintz, Adam)
May 25, 2017 Filing 161 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Michael Hall on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG. (Hall, Jason)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #159 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/22/2017) (rj)
May 18, 2017 Filing 159 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Matthew J. Porpora dated May 18, 2017. Document filed by National Australia Bank Limited.(Porpora, Matthew)
May 5, 2017 Filing 158 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Appearance of Brian S. Fraser re: #30 Notice of Appearance. Document filed by ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., ICAP plc. (Fraser, Brian)
May 1, 2017 Filing 157 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Edward Y. Kroub on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson LLP, 61 Broadway, Suite 501, New York, NY, USA 10006, 2126081900. (Kroub, Edward)
April 28, 2017 Filing 156 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #132 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Briganti, Vincent)
April 28, 2017 Filing 155 DECLARATION of Edward Y. Kroub in Opposition re: #132 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1, #2 Exhibit A Part 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C Part 1, #5 Exhibit C Part 2, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Briganti, Vincent)
April 28, 2017 Filing 154 DECLARATION of Lee J. Lefkowitz in Opposition re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1a, #2 Exhibit 1b, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #4 Exhibit 2 Part 2, #5 Exhibit 2 Part 3, #6 Exhibit 2 Part 4, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5 Part 1, #10 Exhibit 5 Part 2, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8 Part 1, #14 Exhibit 8 Part 2, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12, #19 Exhibit 13 Part 1, #20 Exhibit 13 Part 2, #21 Exhibit 13 Part 3, #22 Exhibit 14, #23 Exhibit 15, #24 Exhibit 16, #25 Exhibit 17, #26 Exhibit 18, #27 Exhibit 19)(Lefkowitz, Lee)
April 28, 2017 Filing 153 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. . Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Briganti, Vincent)
April 28, 2017 Filing 152 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Y. Kroub on behalf of Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Kroub, Edward)
April 28, 2017 Filing 151 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Lovell on behalf of Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Lovell, Christopher)
April 28, 2017 Filing 150 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Lovell on behalf of Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Lovell, Christopher)
April 19, 2017 Filing 149 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Craig Turner on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Turner, Alan)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting #147 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/17/2017) (Kaplan, Lewis)
April 17, 2017 Filing 147 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss, addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Vincent Briganti dated April 17, 2017. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd..(Briganti, Vincent)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #143 Motion for Anthony Van Vuren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/27/2017) (cla)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF SOPHIE C. ROHNKE. The undersigned counsel for Defendant Royal Banlc of Canada hereby requests that the Court withdraw my appearance in the above-captioned matter. No substitution counsel is necessary as said Defendant is represented by Goodwin Procter LLP. Defendant is aware of and consents to my withdrawal. So ordered. Attorney Sophie-Charlotte Rohnke terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/27/2017) (rjm)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ELIZABETH M. ZITO. The undersigned counsel for Defendant Royal Bank of Canada hereby requests that the Court withdraw my appearance in the above-captioned matter. No substitution counsel is necessary as said Defendant is represented by Goodwin Procter LLP. Defendant is aware of and consents to my withdrawal. So ordered. Attorney Elizabeth M. Zito terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/27/2017) (rjm)
March 24, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #143 MOTION for Anthony Van Vuren to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants Morgan Stanley and Morgan Stanley Australia Limited. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13459582. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed b. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
March 24, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #142 MOTION for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants Morgan Stanley and Morgan Stanley Australia Limited. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13459503. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by C. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
March 23, 2017 Filing 143 MOTION for Anthony Van Vuren to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants Morgan Stanley and Morgan Stanley Australia Limited. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13459582. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support Of Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Van Vuren, Anthony)
March 23, 2017 Filing 142 MOTION for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants Morgan Stanley and Morgan Stanley Australia Limited. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13459503. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support Of Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Roellke, Jon) Modified on 3/24/2017 (ma). Modified on 3/24/2017 (ma).
March 23, 2017 Filing 141 NOTICE of Withdrawal. Document filed by Royal Bank of Canada. (Zito, Elizabeth)
March 23, 2017 Filing 140 NOTICE of Withdrawal. Document filed by Royal Bank of Canada. (Rohnke, Sophie-Charlotte)
March 3, 2017 Filing 139 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent NEX Group plc for ICAP plc. Document filed by ICAP plc.(Gaither, H.)
March 3, 2017 Filing 138 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Exco Overseas Limited, Other Affiliate TP ICAP plc, Other Affiliate Schroders PLC for ICAP Australia Pty Ltd.. Document filed by ICAP Australia Pty Ltd..(Gaither, H.)
February 27, 2017 Filing 137 DECLARATION of Paul Szalajko in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Morgan Stanley Australia Limited. (Schacter, Kenneth)
February 24, 2017 Filing 136 DECLARATION of Stephen H. O. Clarke in Support re: #132 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by National Australia Bank Limited. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14_1, #16 Exhibit 14_2, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32)(Braff, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 135 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #132 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 134 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #132 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., ICAP plc, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., LLoyds Bank PLC, Lloyds Banking Group plc, Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon PLC, UBS AG, Westpac Banking Corporation. (Braff, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 133 DECLARATION of Paul Szalajko in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Morgan Stanley Australia Limited. (Schacter, Kenneth)
February 24, 2017 Filing 132 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., ICAP plc, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., LLoyds Bank PLC, Lloyds Banking Group plc, Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon PLC, UBS AG, Westpac Banking Corporation.(Braff, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 131 DECLARATION of David Alexander McLean in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Westpac Banking Corporation. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 130 DECLARATION of John Connors in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by UBS AG. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 129 DECLARATION of Paul Haddow in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd.. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 128 DECLARATION of Phillip Price in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Tullett Prebon PLC. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 127 DECLARATION of William Gougherty in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 126 DECLARATION of Paul Serritella in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Royal Bank of Canada. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 125 DECLARATION of Louise Thomson in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by National Australia Bank Limited. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 124 DECLARATION of Matthew Gummer in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Macquarie Group Ltd.. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 123 DECLARATION of Matthew Gummer in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Macquarie Bank Ltd.. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 122 DECLARATION of Kevin P. McKendry in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by LLoyds Bank PLC, Lloyds Banking Group plc. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 121 DECLARATION of Bradley Howell in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by ICAP Australia Pty Ltd.. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Deborah Abrehart in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by ICAP plc. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 119 DECLARATION of Robert Agati in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by HSBC Bank Australia Limited. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 118 DECLARATION of Mark Chambers in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by HSBC Holdings plc. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 117 DECLARATION of Stela C. Tipi in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 116 DECLARATION of Joseph P. Randazzo in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Daniel Klay in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Credit Suisse Group AG. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 114 DECLARATION of Daniel Klay in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 113 DECLARATION of Mark Robert Alexander in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Commonwealth Bank of Australia. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 112 DECLARATION of Julie Lauck in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by BNP Paribas, S.A.. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 111 DECLARATION of Brian James Maddigan in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd.. (Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. . Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., ICAP plc, LLoyds Bank PLC, Lloyds Banking Group plc, Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd., Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon PLC, UBS AG, Westpac Banking Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Class Action Complaint)(Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction //Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, S.A., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., ICAP plc, LLoyds Bank PLC, Lloyds Banking Group plc, Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd., Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon PLC, UBS AG, Westpac Banking Corporation.(Januszewski, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 108 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets LLC. Document filed by RBC Capital Markets LLC.(Fishman, Marshall)
February 24, 2017 Filing 107 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent RBS Group for RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC; Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC; Corporate Parent RBS Holdings N.V., Other Affiliate RFS Holdings B.V., Other Affiliate RBS Group for RBS N.V.. Document filed by RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC.(Lesser, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 106 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jamie Stephen Dycus on behalf of RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC. (Dycus, Jamie)
February 24, 2017 Filing 105 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Sapir Lesser on behalf of RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC. (Lesser, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 104 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Fraser Lee Hunter, Jr on behalf of RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC. (Hunter, Fraser)
February 23, 2017 Filing 103 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by BNP Paribas, S.A..(Obie, Stephen)
February 23, 2017 Filing 102 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Jay Obie on behalf of BNP Paribas, S.A.. (Obie, Stephen)
February 23, 2017 Filing 101 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jayant W. Tambe on behalf of BNP Paribas, S.A.. (Tambe, Jayant)
February 23, 2017 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kelly A. Carrero on behalf of BNP Paribas, S.A.. (Carrero, Kelly)
February 22, 2017 Filing 99 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Gray Cameron on behalf of Westpac Banking Corporation. (Cameron, Timothy)
February 22, 2017 Filing 98 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael A Paskin on behalf of Westpac Banking Corporation. (Paskin, Michael)
February 22, 2017 Filing 97 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Slifkin on behalf of Westpac Banking Corporation. (Slifkin, Daniel)
February 22, 2017 Filing 96 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate J.P. Morgan Nominees Australia Ltd., Other Affiliate HSBC Custody Nominees (Australia) Limited for Westpac Banking Corporation. Document filed by Westpac Banking Corporation.(Slifkin, Daniel)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #94 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Granted to the extent of 45 pages. Otherwise denied. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/20/2017) (cla) Modified on 2/23/2017 (cla).
February 17, 2017 Filing 94 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Matthew J. Porpora dated February 17, 2017. Document filed by National Australia Bank Limited.(Porpora, Matthew)
February 17, 2017 Filing 93 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by National Australia Bank Limited.(Braff, David)
February 17, 2017 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Hendrix Oliver Clarke on behalf of National Australia Bank Limited. (Clarke, Stephen)
February 17, 2017 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Joseph Porpora on behalf of National Australia Bank Limited. (Porpora, Matthew)
February 17, 2017 Filing 90 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Harold Braff on behalf of National Australia Bank Limited. (Braff, David)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ON MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE granting #88 Motion for Thomas J. Perrelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/16/2017) (cla)
February 15, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #88 MOTION for Thomas J. Perrelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
February 15, 2017 Filing 88 MOTION for Thomas J. Perrelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing (District of Columbia), #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing (Virginia), #4 Proposed Order)(Perrelli, Thomas)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER ON MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE granting #84 Motion for Emma P. Simson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/15/2017) (cla)
February 8, 2017 Filing 86 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marshall Howard Fishman on behalf of RBC Capital Markets LLC. (Fishman, Marshall)
February 8, 2017 Filing 85 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine Vanessa Sama on behalf of RBC Capital Markets LLC. (Sama, Christine)
February 8, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #84 MOTION for Emma P. Simson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 8, 2017 Filing 84 MOTION for Emma P. Simson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing (District of Columbia), #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing (Maryland), #4 Proposed Order)(Simson, Emma)
February 8, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #83 MOTION for Thomas J. Perrelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
February 8, 2017 Filing 83 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Thomas J. Perrelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing (District of Columbia), #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing (Virginia), #4 Proposed Order)(Perrelli, Thomas) Modified on 2/8/2017 (bcu).
February 6, 2017 Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eamonn Wesley Campbell on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Campbell, Eamonn)
February 6, 2017 Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine Vanessa Sama on behalf of Royal Bank of Canada. (Sama, Christine)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER RE SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/2/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 21B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. As further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/2/2017) (anc)
February 2, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #78 MOTION for Emma P. Simson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13269334. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #77 MOTION for Thomas J. Perrelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13269303. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pursuant to rule 1.3. please attach and affadavit or Declaration of the Attorney;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
February 1, 2017 Filing 79 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Ascher, Stephen)
February 1, 2017 Filing 78 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Emma P. Simson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13269334. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Simson, Emma) Modified on 2/2/2017 (wb).
February 1, 2017 Filing 77 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Thomas J. Perrelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13269303. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Perrelli, Thomas) Modified on 2/2/2017 (wb).
February 1, 2017 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Joshua Lichtman on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG. (Lichtman, Andrew)
February 1, 2017 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Louis Ascher on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG. (Ascher, Stephen)
January 24, 2017 Filing 74 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Marshall Howard Fishman on behalf of RBC Capital Markets LLC, Royal Bank of Canada. New Address: Goodwin Procter LLP, The New York Times Building, 620 Eighth Avenue, New York, NY, USA 10018, (212) 813-8800. (Fishman, Marshall)
January 5, 2017 Filing 73 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UBS Group AG for UBS AG. Document filed by UBS AG.(Sullivan, Peter)
December 23, 2016 Filing 72 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chiyoda-ku, Corporate Parent Tokyo 100-8330, Corporate Parent Mistubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. 7-1 Marunouchi 2-chome for Morgan Stanley. Document filed by Morgan Stanley.(Schacter, Kenneth)
December 23, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Kenneth Ian Schacter to RE-FILE Document #67 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
December 22, 2016 Filing 71 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Macquarie Group Limited for Macquarie Bank Ltd.. Document filed by Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd..(Paparella, Christopher)
December 22, 2016 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Alan Weinstein on behalf of Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd.. (Weinstein, Marc)
December 22, 2016 Filing 69 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Martin Paparella on behalf of Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd.. (Paparella, Christopher)
December 22, 2016 Filing 68 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley International Incorporated for Morgan Stanley Australia Limited. Document filed by Morgan Stanley Australia Limited.(Schacter, Kenneth)
December 22, 2016 Filing 67 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Morgan Stanley.(Schacter, Kenneth) Modified on 12/23/2016 (lb).
December 22, 2016 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Ian Schacter on behalf of Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited. (Schacter, Kenneth)
December 20, 2016 Filing 65 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to LLoyds Bank PLC, Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Australia, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC. (dgo)
December 20, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee Jason Lefkowitz on behalf of Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Lefkowitz, Lee)
December 19, 2016 Filing 63 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #60 Amended Complaint,,,,,, against Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, Australia Branch, BNP Paribas, S.A., Bank of New Zealand, Citibank N.A., Australia Branch, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Australia Branch, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., ICAP plc, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Australia, John Does Nos. 1-50, LLoyds Bank PLC, Lloyds Banking Group plc, Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Australia, Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Canada, Australia Branch, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon PLC, UBS AG, UBS AG, Australia Branch, Westpac Banking Corporation, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Australia Branch with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P.. Related document: #60 Amended Complaint,,,,,, filed by FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Richard Dennis, Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd., FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P..(Briganti, Vincent)
December 19, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Vincent Briganti to RE-FILE re: Document No. #60 Amended Complaint,,,,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; Add The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC to the docket. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dgo)
December 19, 2016 Filing 62 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #52 Motion for Nowell D. Bamberger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/19/2016) (cla) Modified on 1/30/2017 (cla).
December 16, 2016 Filing 61 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Royal Bank of Scotland Plc, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Lloyds Bank plc, Lloyds TSB Bank plc, Australia, re: #60 Amended Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix ScheduleA)(Briganti, Vincent)
December 16, 2016 Filing 60 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERRORFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,,, against Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, Australia Branch, BNP Paribas, S.A., Bank of New Zealand, Citibank N.A., Australia Branch, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Australia Branch, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., ICAP plc, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Australia, John Does Nos. 1-50, Lloyds Banking Group plc, Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Canada, Australia Branch, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon PLC, UBS AG, UBS AG, Australia Branch, Westpac Banking Corporation, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, LLoyds Bank PLC, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Australia with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P.. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Richard Dennis, Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd., FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P..(Briganti, Vincent) Modified on 12/19/2016 (dgo).
December 16, 2016 Filing 59 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Adam Kirsch on behalf of UBS AG. (Kirsch, Mark)
December 16, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Sullivan on behalf of UBS AG. (Sullivan, Peter)
December 16, 2016 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jefferson Eliot Bell on behalf of UBS AG. (Bell, Jefferson)
December 16, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Jonathan Stock on behalf of UBS AG. (Stock, Eric)
December 14, 2016 Filing 55 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by HSBC Holdings plc.(Liman, Lewis)
December 14, 2016 Filing 54 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate HSBC Holdings plc for HSBC Bank Australia Limited. Document filed by HSBC Bank Australia Limited.(Liman, Lewis)
December 14, 2016 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roland Raymond St. Louis, III on behalf of Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (St. Louis, Roland)
December 14, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #52 MOTION for Nowell D. Bamberger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13097338. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jcu)
December 14, 2016 Filing 52 MOTION for Nowell D. Bamberger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13097338. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bamberger, Nowell)
December 14, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Breon Stacey Peace on behalf of HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc. (Peace, Breon)
December 14, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Kennedy Park on behalf of HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc. (Park, Jennifer)
December 14, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lewis J. Liman on behalf of HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc. (Liman, Lewis)
December 13, 2016 Filing 48 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Gluckow, Paul)
December 12, 2016 Filing 47 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG for Credit Suisse AG. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG.(Washer, Herbert)
December 12, 2016 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Herbert Scott Washer on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG. (Washer, Herbert)
December 12, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David George Januszewski on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG. (Januszewski, David)
December 12, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elai E. Katz on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG. (Katz, Elai)
December 12, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sheila Chithran Ramesh on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG. (Ramesh, Sheila)
December 8, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Sparks Bradley, Rachel)
December 8, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Steven Carnevale on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Carnevale, Michael)
December 8, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Omari Largos Royter Mason on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Mason, Omari)
December 8, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Nuo Li on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Li, Alexander)
December 8, 2016 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Francis John Acott on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Acott, Francis)
December 8, 2016 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abram Jeremy Ellis on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Ellis, Abram)
December 8, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Christopher Gluckow on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Gluckow, Paul)
December 8, 2016 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas C. Rice on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Rice, Thomas)
December 1, 2016 Filing 34 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Exco Overseas Limited for ICAP Australia Pty Ltd.. Document filed by ICAP Australia Pty Ltd..(Fraser, Brian)
December 1, 2016 Filing 33 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Schroders PLC for ICAP plc. Document filed by ICAP plc.(Fraser, Brian)
December 1, 2016 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by H. Rowan Gaither, IV on behalf of ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., ICAP plc. (Gaither, H.)
December 1, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shari A. Brandt on behalf of ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., ICAP plc. (Brandt, Shari)
December 1, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian S. Fraser on behalf of ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., ICAP plc. (Fraser, Brian)
November 30, 2016 Filing 29 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Schroders plc for Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon PLC. Document filed by Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon PLC.(Davis, Harry)
November 30, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Theodore Kohn on behalf of Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon PLC. (Kohn, Brian)
November 30, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harry Simeon Davis on behalf of Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon PLC. (Davis, Harry)
November 29, 2016 Filing 26 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lloyds Banking Group plc.(Gottridge, Marc)
November 29, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Andrew Fleming on behalf of Lloyds Banking Group plc. (Fleming, Benjamin)
November 29, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Timothy Baumann on behalf of Lloyds Banking Group plc. (Baumann, Kevin)
November 29, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Jean Fried on behalf of Lloyds Banking Group plc. (Fried, Lisa)
November 29, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Joel Gottridge on behalf of Lloyds Banking Group plc. (Gottridge, Marc)
November 22, 2016 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Commonwealth Bank of Australia.(Scott, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Aaron Popovsky on behalf of Commonwealth Bank of Australia. (Popovsky, Mark)
November 22, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey T. Scott on behalf of Commonwealth Bank of Australia. (Scott, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sophie-Charlotte Rohnke on behalf of Royal Bank of Canada. (Rohnke, Sophie-Charlotte)
November 22, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth M. Zito on behalf of Royal Bank of Canada. (Zito, Elizabeth)
November 22, 2016 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Royal Bank of Canada.(Fishman, Marshall)
November 22, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marshall Howard Fishman on behalf of Royal Bank of Canada. (Fishman, Marshall)
November 21, 2016 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry Washor dated 11/1/2016 re: No objection to your Honor presiding over the above-referenced matter. (cla)
November 21, 2016 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd..(Shane, Penny)
November 21, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Penny Shane on behalf of Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd.. (Shane, Penny)
November 21, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Corey Omer on behalf of Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd.. (Omer, Corey)
November 21, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Michael Viapiano on behalf of Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd.. (Viapiano, Christopher)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SERVICE AND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows: Subject to the provisions set forth in paragraph 4 below and the reservation of rights contained in paragraph 5 below, the Stipulating Defendants agree to waive service of the Summons and Complaint. Plaintiffs may file an Amended Complaint on or before December 16, 2016. The time for the Stipulating Defendants to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint or, if an Amended Complaint is filed, the Amended Complaint is extended to and includes February 24, 2017. If one or more of the Stipulating Defendants move to dismiss the Complaint or Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs shall respond on or before April 28, 2017. The Stipulating Defendants may file replies on their motion(s) on or before May 25, 2017. Discovery is stayed pending the resolution of the Stipulating Defendants' forthcoming motion(s) to dismiss; except that if any Stipulating Defendant moves to dismiss the Amended Complaint on the ground that this Court lacks personal jurisdiction as to it pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiffs may seek leave of Court to conduct jurisdictional discovery with respect to that Stipulating Defendant and additional time to file their opposition(s) to the Rule 12(b)(2) motion(s) to dismiss in order to conduct such discovery, as further set out in the order. (Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd. answer due 2/24/2017; BNP Paribas, S.A. answer due 2/24/2017; Citibank, N.A. answer due 2/24/2017; Citigroup Inc. answer due 2/24/2017; Credit Suisse AG answer due 2/24/2017; Credit Suisse Group AG answer due 2/24/2017; Deutsche Bank AG answer due 2/24/2017; HSBC Bank Australia Limited answer due 2/24/2017; HSBC Holdings plc answer due 2/24/2017; ICAP Australia Pty Ltd. answer due 2/24/2017; ICAP plc answer due 2/24/2017; JPMorgan Chase & Co. answer due 2/24/2017; JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 2/24/2017; Lloyds Banking Group plc answer due 2/24/2017; Macquarie Bank Ltd. answer due 2/24/2017; Macquarie Group Ltd. answer due 2/24/2017; Morgan Stanley answer due 2/24/2017; Morgan Stanley Australia Limited answer due 2/24/2017; RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited answer due 2/24/2017; RBS N.V. answer due 2/24/2017; Royal Bank of Canada answer due 2/24/2017; The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC answer due 2/24/2017; Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd. answer due 2/24/2017; Tullett Prebon PLC answer due 2/24/2017; UBS AG answer due 2/24/2017; Westpac Banking Corporation answer due 2/24/2017.) (Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2016., Responses due by 4/28/2017, Replies due by 5/25/2017.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/16/2016) (cla)
August 18, 2016 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, Australia Branch, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Holdings plc, ICAP plc, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lloyds Banking Group plc, Macquarie Bank Ltd., Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, Australia Branch, Tullett Prebon PLC, UBS AG. (rch)
August 17, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christian Levis on behalf of Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Levis, Christian)
August 17, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Raymond Peter Girnys on behalf of Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Girnys, Raymond)
August 17, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Dexter St. Phillip, Jr on behalf of Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (St. Phillip, Peter)
August 17, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Geoffrey Milbank Horn on behalf of Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Horn, Geoffrey)
August 17, 2016 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, Australia Branch, BNP Paribas, S.A., Bank of New Zealand, Citibank N.A., Australia Branch, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Australia Branch, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., ICAP plc, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Australia, John Does Nos. 1-50, Lloyds Banking Group plc, Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Canada, Australia Branch, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon PLC, UBS AG, UBS AG, Australia Branch, Westpac Banking Corporation., re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. (Briganti, Vincent)
August 17, 2016 Case Designated ECF. (rch)
August 17, 2016 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (rch)
August 17, 2016 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (rch)
August 17, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Vincent Briganti. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (rch)
August 17, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Schedule A to Civil Cover Sheet)(Briganti, Vincent)
August 17, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Vincent Briganti. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (rch)
August 17, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Vincent Briganti. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (rch)
August 16, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd., BNP Paribas, Australia Branch, BNP Paribas, S.A., Bank of New Zealand, Citibank N.A., Australia Branch, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc., Commonwealth Bank of Australia, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Australia Branch, HSBC Bank Australia Limited, HSBC Holdings plc, ICAP Australia Pty Ltd., ICAP plc, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Australia, John Does Nos. 1-50, Lloyds Banking Group plc, Macquarie Bank Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley Australia Limited, National Australia Bank Limited, RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited, RBS N.V., Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Canada, Australia Branch, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd., Tullett Prebon PLC, UBS AG, UBS AG, Australia Branch, Westpac Banking Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12658758)Document filed by FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Richard Dennis, FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P..(Briganti, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis et al v. JPMorgan Chase & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Geoffrey Milbank Horn
Represented By: Raymond Peter Girnys
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Represented By: Margaret Ciavarella MacLean
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip, Jr
Represented By: Lee Jason Lefkowitz
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Represented By: Sitso W. Bediako
Represented By: Roland Raymond St. Louis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Geoffrey Milbank Horn
Represented By: Raymond Peter Girnys
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Represented By: Margaret Ciavarella MacLean
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip, Jr
Represented By: Lee Jason Lefkowitz
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Represented By: Sitso W. Bediako
Represented By: Roland Raymond St. Louis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dennis
Represented By: Geoffrey Milbank Horn
Represented By: Raymond Peter Girnys
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Represented By: Margaret Ciavarella MacLean
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip, Jr
Represented By: Lee Jason Lefkowitz
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Represented By: Sitso W. Bediako
Represented By: Roland Raymond St. Louis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Geoffrey Milbank Horn
Represented By: Raymond Peter Girnys
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Represented By: Margaret Ciavarella MacLean
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip, Jr
Represented By: Lee Jason Lefkowitz
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Represented By: Sitso W. Bediako
Represented By: Roland Raymond St. Louis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Geoffrey Milbank Horn
Represented By: Raymond Peter Girnys
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Represented By: Margaret Ciavarella MacLean
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip, Jr
Represented By: Lee Jason Lefkowitz
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Represented By: Sitso W. Bediako
Represented By: Roland Raymond St. Louis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orange County Employees Retirement System
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Egan
Represented By: Todd Seaver
Represented By: Carl Hammarskjold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Australia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas, Australia Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC
Represented By: Fraser Lee Hunter, Jr
Represented By: Jamie Stephen Dycus
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Scotland PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLoyds Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings plc
Represented By: Jennifer Kennedy Park
Represented By: Breon Stacey Peace
Represented By: Charity Eunah Lee
Represented By: Nowell D. Bamberger
Represented By: Lewis J. Liman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Group AG
Represented By: Jason Michael Hall
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer
Represented By: Sheila Chithran Ramesh
Represented By: Elai E. Katz
Represented By: David George Januszewski
Represented By: Adam Shawn Mintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Zito
Represented By: Marshall Howard Fishman
Represented By: Christine Vanessa Sama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Canada
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Zito
Represented By: Marshall Howard Fishman
Represented By: Sophie-Charlotte Rohnke
Represented By: Christine Vanessa Sama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank N.A., Australia Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Group (Australia) Pty Limited
Represented By: Fraser Lee Hunter, Jr
Represented By: Jamie Stephen Dycus
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS AG
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Represented By: Mark Adam Kirsch
Represented By: Peter Sullivan
Represented By: Jefferson Eliot Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Omari Largos Royter Mason
Represented By: Thomas C. Rice
Represented By: Alan Craig Turner
Represented By: Eamonn Wesley Campbell
Represented By: Paul Christopher Gluckow
Represented By: Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas Menitove
Represented By: Alexander Nuo Li
Represented By: Michael Steven Carnevale
Represented By: Abram Jeremy Ellis
Represented By: Isaac Martin Rethy
Represented By: Mary Beth Forshaw
Represented By: Francis John Acott
Represented By: Sarah Emily Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICAP plc
Represented By: Shari A. Brandt
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither, IV
Represented By: Brian S. Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Represented By: Andrew Joshua Lichtman
Represented By: Emma P. Simson
Represented By: Thomas J. Perrelli
Represented By: Stephen Louis Ascher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Group Ltd.
Represented By: Marc Alan Weinstein
Represented By: Christopher Martin Paparella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New Zealand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS AG, Australia Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Omari Largos Royter Mason
Represented By: Thomas C. Rice
Represented By: Alan Craig Turner
Represented By: Eamonn Wesley Campbell
Represented By: Paul Christopher Gluckow
Represented By: Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas Menitove
Represented By: Alexander Nuo Li
Represented By: Michael Steven Carnevale
Represented By: Abram Jeremy Ellis
Represented By: Isaac Martin Rethy
Represented By: Mary Beth Forshaw
Represented By: Francis John Acott
Represented By: Sarah Emily Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICAP Australia Pty Ltd.
Represented By: Shari A. Brandt
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither, IV
Represented By: Brian S. Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS N.V.
Represented By: Fraser Lee Hunter, Jr
Represented By: Jamie Stephen Dycus
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Canada, Australia Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank Australia Limited
Represented By: Jennifer Kennedy Park
Represented By: Breon Stacey Peace
Represented By: Charity Eunah Lee
Represented By: Nowell D. Bamberger
Represented By: Lewis J. Liman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Australia Bank Limited
Represented By: David Harold Braff
Represented By: Stephen Hendrix Oliver Clarke
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Porpora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tullett Prebon PLC
Represented By: Harry Simeon Davis
Represented By: Brian Theodore Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse AG
Represented By: Jason Michael Hall
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer
Represented By: Sheila Chithran Ramesh
Represented By: Elai E. Katz
Represented By: David George Januszewski
Represented By: Adam Shawn Mintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC
Represented By: Fraser Lee Hunter, Jr
Represented By: Jamie Stephen Dycus
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Australia and New Zealand Banking Group Ltd.
Represented By: Penny Shane, II
Represented By: Corey Omer
Represented By: Christopher Michael Viapiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Bank Ltd.
Represented By: Marc Alan Weinstein
Represented By: Christopher Martin Paparella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does Nos. 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Australia Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyds Banking Group plc
Represented By: Kevin Timothy Baumann
Represented By: Marc Joel Gottridge
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Represented By: Lisa Jean Fried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westpac Banking Corporation
Represented By: Timothy Gray Cameron
Represented By: Michael A Paskin
Represented By: Daniel Slifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG, Australia Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Australia Limited
Represented By: Anthony R. Van Vuren
Represented By: Jon Randall Roellke
Represented By: Kenneth Ian Schacter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Bank of Australia
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Scott
Represented By: Mark Aaron Popovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley
Represented By: Anthony R. Van Vuren
Represented By: Jon Randall Roellke
Represented By: Kenneth Ian Schacter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tullett Prebon (Australia) Pty Ltd.
Represented By: Harry Simeon Davis
Represented By: Brian Theodore Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Australia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas, S.A.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carrero
Represented By: Jayant W. Tambe
Represented By: Stephen Jay Obie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?