Murray et al v. City Of New York, New York
Plaintiff: Murray, Susana Diaz, Candace Radford, Ryan Rodriguez, Wayne Neal, Terease Butler, Anita L. Alston-Roberts, Rachel Santiago, Doressa Sweeting, Salas Addo, John C. Chibuzo, Kathleen M. Falokun, Kareem McCray, Amada Flynn, Enel Etienne, Sandra Charles, Trevor Crosby, Diane Salley, Paul Singh, Jannifer Baker, Lashon Allen-Owens, Robin C. Dickerson, Iris D. Bonet, Morning Williams, Chitra Harris, Reynold Piquant, Norman E. Bouldine, Debora Brown, Charles Flagg, Kathlyn Roach, Monica Cumberbatch, David Escourse, Cory M. Black, Eulit Miller, Ricardo Ford, Carl Young, Amanda Bracey, Milous Johnson, Wendy Anderson, Felix Rodriguez, Lisa Chen-Reid, Ernest Miller, Garry Dulorie, Jose A. Balbuena, Okojie I. Ambrose, Delphina Lewis, Keisha R. Collins, Sandra McCoy, Julia Kolmkova, Valencia M. Brown, Tiecha Merritt, Allen Stevens, Nicole Brown, Yolanda Huddivant, Melody Thompson, Vadim M. Bishinkevich, Zeraida Duprey, Julia Pabon, Raymond Flament, Anne-Marie David, Evon Reyes, Felix P. Akpona, Kikelomo Adedayo, Errol McNaught, Jerome Taylor, Tammy Brewer, Fabio L. Alvarez, Wilmot Reedy, Natalia Jennings, Ghulam Farhad, Nicole David, Ashley Hamilton, Miriam L. Centeno, Beverly St. Hill, Kembey Biewan, Frederick Jack, Udoh Arit, Natocha T. Daney, Carlos Martinez, Stephanie Darrisaw, Samantha N. Donaldson, Venair Heyward, Florence Adedoyin, Mireille Vital, Oneka Fordyce, Marilu Alicea, Oluremi Balogun, Yeudy Villalona, Jasmine McNeill, Trevor E. Cofield, Courtney L. Buckley, Utilde Charles, Penniellen Bergholz, Clive Phillip, Mark Richards, Jacquee Elie, Clifford Couloute, Anthony Davis, Lynette McDonald, Nia M. Dillion, Jermaine Bascom, Daniel Bickram, Artenkah Carswell, Johnbull Ehigiator, Sha Li Huang, Richard Nedd, Pedro Gomez, Kimberley Butler, Odetta Jervis, Charde Baker, Victor Matos, Mayra Rodriguez, Chadwick Beauford, Abdul-Mladi Abdul-Karim, Juliette Quoquoi, Celeste A. Akulin, Marjorie Smith, Lawrence Johnson, Nora S. Cameron, Michael Coleman, Darek L. Clark, Anneliee Almonte, Franklin J. Fernandez, Vernon Bowden, Patrick Rose, Michael Jefferson, Frank Cabrera, Jose Rodriguez, Monique Murray, Ademola A. Adesamy, Nadir Ahmed, Michael Caldwell, Hermenegildo Rodriguez, Elizabeth A. Adedeji, Chima Dimoriaku, Sadiat Bello-Bakare, Cecilia Colon-Ortiz, Pranay K. Deb, Suzette Coles, Dionne Handricks, Deshann Willis, Michael Camacho, Randolph Farrow, Connie Robinson, Barbara Fogle, Jose M. Figueroa, Maria Corporan Cintron, Claubel Espirosa, Audrey A. Belton, Olatunbosun A. Adeagbo, Gisselle Cassanora, Elba Cruz-Toribico, Lendel Adams, Dolores Chauncey, Yanet Diaz-Flores, Norman Williams Jr., Arline L. Brown, Cynthia El-Ansari, Latish Banks, Johnson Ogunleye, Wendell Bowens, Roxanne St. Hill, Hubert Caleb, Michael Callender, Juanelle Small, Constantina Cifu, Cyrlene Y. Barnett, Lidiya Khenkina, Giselle Marks, Pelagie Djahoue, Vincent Ejiamire, Cedrie Connell, Errol Dicks, Magalie Amlicar, Eddie Finley, Kofoworola Akimrimisi, Chevelle K. Bethea, Margaret Cummins, Ifeyinwa Okeya, Gabriel B. Ariwodola, Thelma Avery, Germaine Stewart, Luis Brown, Terry Bayne, Trevor Gordon, Maurice R. Ayala, Nesha Borrero, Joyce Bullock, Althea Dickson, Emmett Sealey, Richard Arroyo, Robert Kerlcula, Geraldine Latimer, Christopher R. Bran, Shalaine Sumpter, Benneth Ekwegbalu, Cherise Armstrong, Karlene Garrick, Elnora Fludd, Kenneth R. Boatswain, Uloma Enyi, Rosedi Morales, Ricardo Duperval, Erik Giordano, Valentyna Masyk, Suzanne Kellar, Allston Evans, Leonard Crowley, Corey Evans, Darrell D. Dorsey, Donald Dyce, Lizar D. Alexander, Doreatha Williams, Kaliah Bright, Alfred E. Antini, Derrick D. Askins, Kaye L. Allen, Gloria Brown, Jocelyne N. Chamblin, Antoine Bolouvi, Hernol Amen Rah, Isaac O. Alao, Lennard Faustin, Henry Aiyanyo, Faruk Danmole, Linda M. Browne, Boris J. Calderon, Anibal Allende, Jr., Idayat O. Adeniji, Gregory A. Scott, Jani Cauthen, Regina M. Butler, Tommy Johnson, Samuel Austin, Cheryl Williams, David Kayode, Jamie Easton, Creola Atchison, Franklin Fenton, Doritha N. Decaul and Alicia Jackson
Defendant: City Of New York and City Of New York, New York
Case Number: 1:2016cv08072
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/26/2019 Replies due by 8/9/2019. (ama)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER: granting #123 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. FINAL. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/10/2019) (ama)
June 9, 2019 Filing 123 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file Summary Judgment Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Corbin Carter dated 6/9/2019. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Carter, John)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMO ENDORSED ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: granting #121 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion granted. So Ordered. Attorney William Li terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/20/2019) (js) (Main Document 122 replaced on 6/10/2019) (jwh).
May 14, 2019 Filing 121 MOTION for William Li to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Monique Murray. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ricksecker, David)
April 26, 2019 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Gregory K. McGillivary in Support re: #117 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Kaliah Bright, Robin Dickerson, Oneka Fordyce, Ashley Hamilton, Ryan Rodriguez, Greg Scott and Kina White.. Document filed by Monique Murray. (Attachments: #1 Appendix I, #2 Appendix II, #3 Appendix III, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5)(McGillivary, Gregory)
April 26, 2019 Filing 119 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Monique Murray. (McGillivary, Gregory)
April 26, 2019 Filing 118 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #117 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Kaliah Bright, Robin Dickerson, Oneka Fordyce, Ashley Hamilton, Ryan Rodriguez, Greg Scott and Kina White. . Document filed by Monique Murray. (McGillivary, Gregory)
April 26, 2019 Filing 117 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Kaliah Bright, Robin Dickerson, Oneka Fordyce, Ashley Hamilton, Ryan Rodriguez, Greg Scott and Kina White. Document filed by Monique Murray.(McGillivary, Gregory)
April 12, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by William Li on behalf of Monique Murray. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Li, William)
April 12, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by John Welling Stewart on behalf of Monique Murray. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Stewart, John)
April 12, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Molly Ann Elkin on behalf of Monique Murray. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Elkin, Molly)
April 12, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Hillary Lebeau on behalf of Monique Murray. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Lebeau, Hillary)
April 12, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Afroz Baig on behalf of Monique Murray. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Baig, Afroz)
April 12, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Diana J. Nobile on behalf of Monique Murray. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Nobile, Diana)
April 12, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sarah Michelle Block on behalf of Monique Murray. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Block, Sarah)
April 12, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sara Lyn Faulman on behalf of Monique Murray. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Faulman, Sara)
April 12, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David William Ricksecker on behalf of Monique Murray. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Ricksecker, David)
April 12, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Gregory Keith McGillivary on behalf of Monique Murray. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (McGillivary, Gregory)
March 28, 2019 Mediator Session Held on 3/27/19 at 40 Foley Square.(ah)
January 31, 2019 MEDIATOR SESSION SCHEDULED First Mediation Session scheduled for 3/27/19, 10 A.M. at 40 Foley Square.(ah)
January 29, 2019 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. (mf)
January 25, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrea Mary O'Connor on behalf of City of New York, New York. (O'Connor, Andrea)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER DECLARING CASE ELIGIBLE FOR MEDIATION: To the Clerk of Court: 1. This case is determined to be eligible for mediation as to all issues, as further set forth in this order. Mediation session is scheduled for March 26, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Mediator may adjust date of first session by seven days. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/4/2019. Mediator Expertise Request due by 1/29/2019. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/24/2019) (jwh)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: As a result of a Pre-Trial Conference held before the Court today, the following is ORDERED: 1. Going forward Andrea O'Connor of City Counsel shall appear at all future conferences. 2 Plaintiffs may move for summary judgment as to seven (7) plaintiffs on or before April 26, 2019, defendants shall file their opposition and cross-motion as to seven (7) plaintiffs of their choosing by June 14, 2019. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to defendant's motion and their reply to their motion by July 12. Defendants may reply as to their motion by July 26. THE COURT DOES NOT ANTICIPATE GRANTING ANY ADJOURNMENT OR EXTENSION OF THIS SCHEDULE. 3. Expert discovery extended to March 15, 2019. (Expert Discovery due by 3/15/2019. Motions due by 4/26/2019. Cross Motions due by 6/14/2019. Responses due by 7/12/2019. Replies due by 7/26/2019.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/24/2019) (jwh)
January 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Case Management Conference held on 1/24/2019. See, Order Following Pretrial Conference. Case referred to mediation. (Nacanther, Florence)
January 22, 2019 Filing 102 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Kamen, Garrett)
January 21, 2019 Filing 101 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David Ricksecker dated 1/21/19 re: Pre-Motion Letter Requesting Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment and a Motion Finding Plaintiffs "Similarly Situated" Under the Fair Labor Standards Act. Document filed by Monique Murray.(Ricksecker, David)
January 7, 2019 NOTICE: Case Management Conference originally set for January 25, 2019 is moved to January 24, 2019 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11D at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY. (Nacanther, Florence)
October 9, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Expert Discovery due by 2/8/2019., Fact Discovery due by 1/7/2019.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (rj)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #99 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Final Fact discovery extended to January 7, 2019. Expert Discovery extended to February 8, 2019. Conference adjourned from October 24 to January 25, 2019 at 12:00 pm. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/9/2018) (rj)
October 3, 2018 Filing 99 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Corbin Carter dated 10/3/2018. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Carter, John)
August 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Deposition due by 10/8/2018. Discovery due by 10/8/2018. Expert Discovery due by 11/23/2018. Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (jwh)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #95 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery: Application granted. September 21, 2018 conference adjourned to October 24, 2018 at 10:30 am. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/21/2018) (jwh)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #96 Motion for William Li to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.)
August 14, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #96 MOTION for William Li to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15448400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 14, 2018 Filing 96 MOTION for William Li to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15448400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Monique Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B- Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Li, William)
August 13, 2018 Filing 95 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Limited Purpose) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Corbin Carter dated 8/13/2018. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Carter, John)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Diana J. Nobile to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.)
August 7, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #93 MOTION for Diana J. Nobile to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15417709. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 7, 2018 Filing 93 MOTION for Diana J. Nobile to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15417709. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Monique Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B- Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nobile, Diana)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #91 Motion for Molly Elkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.)
July 26, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #91 MOTION for Molly Elkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
July 26, 2018 Filing 91 MOTION for Molly Elkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Monique Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Elkin, Molly)
July 26, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #90 MOTION for Molly Elkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15372782. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney Affidavit is from Afroz Baig but signed by Molly Elkin. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
July 26, 2018 Filing 90 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Molly Elkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15372782. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Monique Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Elkin, Molly) Modified on 7/26/2018 (jc).
July 18, 2018 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas James Johnson on behalf of Monique Murray. (Johnson, Nicholas)
May 29, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Corbin Carter on behalf of City of New York, New York. (Carter, John)
May 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: (Expert Discovery due by 10/22/2018. Fact Discovery due by 9/6/2018.) Set/Reset Hearings:(Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2018 at 11:45 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (ne)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #84 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact discovery extended to September 6 and expert discovery extended to October 22. Conference adjourned from June 26 to Sept. 21, 2018 at 11:45 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/24/2018) (ne)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANT'S ASSERTION OF THE GOOD FAITH DEFENSE: IT IS THEREFORE AGREED BY AND BETWEEN THE PARTIES AND ORDERED THAT: Defendant agrees to produce: a. Documents and communications between (1) the New York City Law Department ("Law Department"), attorneys within the Department of Homeless Services ("DHS"), the Human Resources Administration ("HRA") and/or outside counsel and (2) non-lawyer employees, or lawyers acting in a non-legal capacity, of the City and/or DHS or HRA pertaining to the legal requirements of the FLSA as applied to DHS pay policies, practices, and procedures. (As further set forth herein.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/21/2018) (kgo)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/21/2018) (kgo)
May 18, 2018 Filing 84 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 5/18/2018. Document filed by Monique Murray.(McGillivary, Gregory)
May 18, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Lyn Faulman on behalf of Monique Murray. (Faulman, Sara)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #81 Motion for John Welling Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.)
April 13, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #81 MOTION for John Welling Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
April 13, 2018 Filing 81 MOTION for John Welling Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Monique Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B- Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stewart, John)
April 11, 2018 Filing 80 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Deshann Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Sue)(McGillivary, Gregory)
April 4, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #79 MOTION for John Welling Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14899400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia (our court does not accept certificates from the Virginia State Bar). Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
April 4, 2018 Filing 79 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for John Welling Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14899400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Monique Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B- Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stewart, John) Modified on 4/4/2018 (jc).
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #77 Motion for Afroz Baig to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.)
March 6, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #77 MOTION for Afroz Baig to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14776088. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
March 6, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION for Afroz Baig to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14776088. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Monique Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baig, Afroz)
February 12, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hillary Lebeau on behalf of Monique Murray. (Lebeau, Hillary)
January 16, 2018 Filing 75 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Cecilia Colon-Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Consent to Sue)(McGillivary, Gregory)
December 7, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: (Expert Discovery due by 7/21/2018., Fact Discovery due by 6/6/2018.), Set/Reset Hearings: (Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (cf)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #73 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Schedule approved as modified and is FINAL. January 5 conference adjourned to June 26, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/7/2017) (cf)
December 7, 2017 Filing 73 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Gregory K. McGillivary and Garrett S. Kamen dated December 7, 2017. Document filed by Monique Murray.(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 21, 2017 Filing 72 ANSWER to #69 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Kamen, Garrett)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. City of New York, New York answer due 11/21/2017 (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/25/2017) (cf)
October 25, 2017 Filing 70 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #69 Amended Complaint,, addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Kamen, Garrett)
October 24, 2017 Filing 69 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #30 Amended Complaint,, against City of New York, New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Gregory A. Scott, Erik Giordano, Benneth Ekwegbalu, Paul Singh, Ryan Rodriguez, Rosedi Morales, Emmett Sealey, Audrey A. Belton, Valentyna Masyk, Monique Murray, Stephanie Darrisaw, Suzette Coles, Wayne Neal, Ashley Hamilton, Allen Stevens, Jasmine McNeill. Related document: #30 Amended Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1, #2 Exhibit Attachment 2, #3 Exhibit Attachment 3, #4 Exhibit Attachment 4)(McGillivary, Gregory)
October 24, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gregory Keith McGillivary to RE-FILE re: Document No. #68 Amended Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; All parties listed on the amended complaint caption title must EXACTLY match the parties selected in the filing of the amended complaint. Gregory A. Scott and Audrey A. Belton do not match what is listed on the amended complaint caption title. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
October 23, 2017 Filing 68 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #30 Amended Complaint,, against City of New York, New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Erik Giordano, Benneth Ekwegbalu, Paul Singh, Rosedi Morales, Emmett Sealey, Audrey A. Belton, Valentyna Masyk, Monique Murray, Stephanie Darrisaw, Suzette Coles, Wayne Neal, Ashley Hamilton, Allen Stevens, Jasmine McNeill, Ryan Rodriguez, Gregory A. Scott. Related document: #30 Amended Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1, #2 Exhibit Attachment 2, #3 Exhibit Attachment 3, #4 Exhibit Attachment 4)(McGillivary, Gregory) Modified on 10/24/2017 (pc).
October 23, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gregory Keith McGillivary to RE-FILE Document No. #67 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; Caption cannot state et al unless court ordered. Each party involved in the case must be listed on the complaint caption title. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
October 20, 2017 Filing 67 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #30 Amended Complaint,, against City of New York, New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Monique Murray. Related document: #30 Amended Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1, #2 Exhibit Attachment 2, #3 Exhibit Attachment 3, #4 Exhibit Attachment 4)(McGillivary, Gregory) Modified on 10/23/2017 (pc).
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #58 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiffs have made a showing that the PSAC incorporates information that was in the City's possession and not readily available to the plaintiffs. The plaintiffs' motion to amend is therefore GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to terminate the motion. (Docket# 58.) Plaintiffs shall file a Second Amended Complaint within seven days of the date of this Order, and as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/17/2017) (ras)
October 17, 2017 Filing 65 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Venair Heyward. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Consent to Sue)(McGillivary, Gregory)
September 29, 2017 Filing 64 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David Ricksecker dated 9/29/2017 re: Response to City's September 28, 2017 Letter. Document filed by Monique Murray.(Ricksecker, David)
September 28, 2017 Filing 63 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel re: Memorandum and Order in Lawtone-Bowles v. City of New York, No. 16-CV-42400 (AJN), 2017 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 155140 (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 22, 2017). Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Kamen, Garrett)
September 8, 2017 Filing 62 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #58 MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Monique Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Declaration of Louis R. Lanier, Ph.D., #2 Exhibit B. Declaration of Monique Murray, #3 Exhibit C. Declaration of Jasmine McNeill)(McGillivary, Gregory)
August 30, 2017 Filing 61 DECLARATION of Garrett Kamen in Opposition re: #58 MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kamen, Garrett)
August 30, 2017 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #58 MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Kamen, Garrett)
August 23, 2017 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #58 MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Monique Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(McGillivary, Gregory)
August 23, 2017 Filing 58 MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Monique Murray.(McGillivary, Gregory)
August 16, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 8/23/2017. Responses due by 8/30/2017 Replies due by 9/8/2017. (cf)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #33 Motion to Certify Class; granting #35 Motion to Dismiss. The defendant's partial motion to dismiss is GRANTED. (Docket # 35.) Plaintiffs' motion for conditional certification is DENIED. (Docket # 33.) The Clerk is directed to terminate the motions. Plaintiffs may file a motion to amend their complaint no later than August 23, 2017. Their motion shall annex a Proposed Second Amended Complaint. Defendant may file a response no later than August 30, 2017, and plaintiffs may file a reply no later than September 8, 2017. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/16/2017) (cf)
August 14, 2017 Filing 56 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 8/14/2017 re: Response to Defendant's August 11, 2017 Letter in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Permission to File a Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Monique Murray.(McGillivary, Gregory)
August 11, 2017 Filing 55 RESPONSE re: #53 Letter . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Kamen, Garrett)
August 10, 2017 Filing 54 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Reynold Piquant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Consent to Sue)(McGillivary, Gregory)
August 9, 2017 Filing 53 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 8/9/2017 re: Request for Permission to Amend the First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Monique Murray.(McGillivary, Gregory)
August 3, 2017 Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Kamen, Garrett)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 DISCOVERY STIPULATION & ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16, the Court Orders as follows: After the completion of discovery relating to Discovery Plaintiffs, either party may request discovery from the Court relating to additional plaintiffs or additional discovery relating to Discovery Plaintiffs outside the scope of this Stipulation upon a showing of need. After the completion of discovery relating to the Discovery Plaintiffs either party may submit a pre motion letter setting proposed motions. The parties will submit a joint briefing schedule relating to any proposed summary judgment and misjoinder/certification motions. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/2/2017) (cf)
July 14, 2017 Filing 50 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Chitra Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Consent to Sue)(McGillivary, Gregory)
July 10, 2017 Filing 49 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Yanet Diaz-Flores, Raymond Flament, Mark Richards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Consent to Sue)(McGillivary, Gregory)
July 7, 2017 Filing 48 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 07/7/2017 Document filed by Monique Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McGillivary, Gregory)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #46 Letter filed by Monique Murray. ENDORSEMENT: Fact discovery extended to December 18 (FINAL). Conference adjourned from July 7 to January 5, 2018 at 11:00 am. SO ORDERED. (Fact Discovery due by 12/18/2017., Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/2/2017) (ap)
May 30, 2017 Filing 46 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Gregory K McGillivary dated 5/30/17 re: Request for Extension of Discovery. Document filed by Monique Murray.(McGillivary, Gregory)
April 27, 2017 Filing 45 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Hubert Caleb, Maria Corporan Cintron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Consent to Sue)(McGillivary, Gregory)
April 13, 2017 Filing 44 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Thelma Avery, Utilde Charles, Eddie Finley, Milous Johnson, Julia Kolmkova, Sandra McCoy, Tiecha Merritt, Patrick Rose, Shalaine Sumpter, Norman Williams Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Consent to Sue)(McGillivary, Gregory)
March 8, 2017 Filing 43 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Elba Cruz-Toribico, Chima Dimoriaku, Karlene Garrick, Trevor Gordon, Natalia Jennings, Ifeyinwa Okeya, Diane Salley, Rachel Santiago, Marjorie Smith, Yeudy Villalona, Carl Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 28, 2017 Filing 42 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #35 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Kamen, Garrett)
February 21, 2017 Filing 41 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and for Notice to Putative Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b). . Document filed by Monique Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jasmine McNeill)(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 21, 2017 Filing 40 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Henry Aiyanyo, Lashon Allen-Owens, Hernol Amen Rah, Magalie Amlicar, Udoh Arit, Cherise Armstrong, Chadwick Beauford, Vernon Bowden, Amanda Bracey, Luis Brown, Michael Callender, Gisselle Cassanora, Jani Cauthen, Sandra Charles, Dolores Chauncey, Lisa Chen-Reid, Constantina Cifu, Michael Coleman, Anthony Davis, Althea Dickson, Donald Dyce, Randolph Farrow, Oneka Fordyce, Pedro Gomez, Dionne Handricks, Sha Li Huang, Yolanda Huddivant, Frederick Jack, Alicia Jackson, Michael Jefferson, Odetta Jervis, Lawrence Johnson, Tommy Johnson, David Kayode, Suzanne Kellar, Robert Kerlcula, Lidiya Khenkina, Geraldine Latimer, Delphina Lewis, Giselle Marks, Carlos Martinez, Victor Matos, Kareem McCray, Lynette McDonald, Errol McNaught, Ernest Miller, Eulit Miller, Richard Nedd, Johnson Ogunleye, Julia Pabon, Clive Phillip, Juliette Quoquoi, Candace Radford, Wilmot Reedy, Evon Reyes, Kathlyn Roach, Connie Robinson, Felix Rodriguez, Hermenegildo Rodriguez, Jose Rodriguez, Mayra Rodriguez, Juanelle Small, Beverly St. Hill, Roxanne St. Hill, Germaine Stewart, Doressa Sweeting, Jerome Taylor, Melody Thompson, Mireille Vital, Cheryl Williams, Doreatha Williams, Morning Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pordy, Hope)
February 17, 2017 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #35 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Monique Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of McGillivary, #2 Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit 1B, #4 Exhibit 1C-1, #5 Exhibit 1C-2, #6 Exhibit 1D, #7 Exhibit 1E, #8 Exhibit 2 - Hernandez Transcript)(Ricksecker, David)
February 14, 2017 Filing 38 DECLARATION in Opposition re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and for Notice to Putative Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b).. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, Lynch Decision)(Kamen, Garrett)
February 14, 2017 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and for Notice to Putative Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b). . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Kamen, Garrett)
February 3, 2017 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #35 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Kamen, Garrett)
February 3, 2017 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Kamen, Garrett)
February 1, 2017 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and for Notice to Putative Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b). . Document filed by Monique Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Notice, #2 Exhibit B. Declaration of Monique Murray, #3 Exhibit C. Declaration of Ashley Hamilton, #4 Exhibit D. Declaration of Emmett Sealey, #5 Exhibit E. Declaration of Erik Giordano, #6 Exhibit F. Declaration of Jasmine McNeill, #7 Exhibit G. Declaration of Allen Stevens, #8 Exhibit H. Declaration of Suzette Coles, #9 Exhibit I. Transcript of May 27, 2015 Hearing)(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 1, 2017 Filing 33 MOTION to Certify Class and for Notice to Putative Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Monique Murray.(McGillivary, Gregory)
January 18, 2017 Transmission to the Case Openings Clerk. Transmitted re: #32 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, to the Case Openings Clerk for case processing. (mro)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. OK. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/17/2017) (mro) Modified on 1/18/2017 (mro).
January 12, 2017 Filing 31 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Hope Pordy dated 01/12/2017. Document filed by Abdul-Mladi Abdul-Karim, Lendel Adams, Salas Addo, Olatunbosun A. Adeagbo, Kikelomo Adedayo, Elizabeth A. Adedeji, Florence Adedoyin, Idayat O. Adeniji, Ademola A. Adesamy, Nadir Ahmed, Kofoworola Akimrimisi, Felix P. Akpona, Celeste A. Akulin, Isaac O. Alao, Lizar D. Alexander, Marilu Alicea, Kaye L. Allen, Anibal Allende, Jr, Anneliee Almonte, Anita L. Alston-Roberts, Fabio L. Alvarez, Okojie I. Ambrose, Wendy Anderson, Alfred E. Antini, Gabriel B. Ariwodola, Richard Arroyo, Derrick D. Askins, Creola Atchison, Samuel Austin, Maurice R. Ayala, Charde Baker, Jannifer Baker, Jose A. Balbuena, Oluremi Balogun, Latish Banks, Cyrlene Y. Barnett, Jermaine Bascom, Terry Bayne, Sadiat Bello-Bakare, Audrey A. Belton, Penniellen Bergholz, Chevelle K. Bethea, Daniel Bickram, Kembey Biewan, Vadim M. Bishinkevich, Cory M. Black, Kenneth R. Boatswain, Antoine Bolouvi, Iris D. Bonet, Nesha Borrero, Norman E. Bouldine, Wendell Bowens, Christopher R. Bran, Tammy Brewer, Kaliah Bright, Arline L. Brown, Debora Brown, Gloria Brown, Nicole Brown, Valencia M. Brown, Linda M. Browne, Courtney L. Buckley, Joyce Bullock, Kimberley Butler, Regina M. Butler, Terease Butler, Frank Cabrera, Boris J. Calderon, Michael Caldwell, Michael Camacho, Nora S. Cameron, Artenkah Carswell, Miriam L. Centeno, Jocelyne N. Chamblin, John C. Chibuzo, Darek L. Clark, Trevor E. Cofield, Suzette Coles, Keisha R. Collins, Cedrie Connell, Clifford Couloute, Trevor Crosby, Leonard Crowley, Monica Cumberbatch, Margaret Cummins, Natocha T. Daney, Faruk Danmole, Stephanie Darrisaw, Anne-Marie David, Nicole David, Pranay K. Deb, Doritha N. Decaul, Susana Diaz, Robin C. Dickerson, Errol Dicks, Nia M. Dillion, Pelagie Djahoue, Samantha N. Donaldson, Darrell D. Dorsey, Garry Dulorie, Ricardo Duperval, Zeraida Duprey, Jamie Easton, Johnbull Ehigiator, Vincent Ejiamire, Benneth Ekwegbalu, Cynthia El-Ansari, Jacquee Elie, Uloma Enyi, David Escourse, Claubel Espirosa, Enel Etienne, Allston Evans, Corey Evans, Kathleen M. Falokun, Ghulam Farhad, Lennard Faustin, Franklin Fenton, Franklin J. Fernandez, Jose M. Figueroa, Charles Flagg, Elnora Fludd, Amada Flynn, Barbara Fogle, Ricardo Ford, Erik Giordano, Ashley Hamilton, Valentyna Masyk, Jasmine McNeill, Rosedi Morales, Monique Murray, Wayne Neal, Emmett Sealey, Paul Singh, Allen Stevens.(Pordy, Hope)
January 12, 2017 Filing 30 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against City of New York, New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Erik Giordano, Benneth Ekwegbalu, Paul Singh, Rosedi Morales, Emmett Sealey, Valentyna Masyk, Monique Murray, Suzette Coles, Wayne Neal, Ashley Hamilton, Allen Stevens, Jasmine McNeill. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Rosedi Morales, Ashley Hamilton, Monique Murray, Wayne Neal, Allen Stevens, Jasmine McNeill, Emmett Sealey, Valentyna Masyk, Benneth Ekwegbalu, Paul Singh, Erik Giordano. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Pordy, Hope) Modified on 1/12/2017 (laq). Modified on 1/24/2017 (laq).
January 11, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Hope Allison Pordy to RE-FILE re: Document No. #29 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; Court's leave has not been granted The amended complaint was incorrectly filed on the due date. Permission from Chambers will have to be obtained when the amended complaint is correctly filed for it to be approved. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (pc)
January 9, 2017 Filing 29 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #28 Amended Complaint. #1 Complaint, against City of New York, New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Antoine Bolouvi, Kofoworola Akimrimisi, Sadiat Bello-Bakare, Wendy Anderson, Amada Flynn, Cory M. Black, Kikelomo Adedayo, Allston Evans, Leonard Crowley, Lennard Faustin, Marilu Alicea, Margaret Cummins, Maurice R. Ayala, Artenkah Carswell, Nadir Ahmed, Pelagie Djahoue, Michael Caldwell, Erik Giordano, Isaac O. Alao, Derrick D. Askins, Keisha R. Collins, Jose M. Figueroa, Nicole Brown, Elnora Fludd, Latish Banks, Jocelyne N. Chamblin, Gloria Brown, Lendel Adams, Okojie I. Ambrose, Florence Adedoyin, Faruk Danmole, Charles Flagg, Valencia M. Brown, Nesha Borrero, Benneth Ekwegbalu, Uloma Enyi, Salas Addo, Charde Baker, Boris J. Calderon, Ricardo Ford, Nicole David, Cynthia El-Ansari, Arline L. Brown, Jose A. Balbuena, Corey Evans, Robin C. Dickerson, Terease Butler, Garry Dulorie, David Escourse, Linda M. Browne, Gabriel B. Ariwodola, Vadim M. Bishinkevich, Wendell Bowens, Jamie Easton, Chevelle K. Bethea, John C. Chibuzo, Kaye L. Allen, Kenneth R. Boatswain, Clifford Couloute, Trevor Crosby, Samantha N. Donaldson, Paul Singh, Anneliee Almonte, Terry Bayne, Rosedi Morales, Franklin Fenton, Doritha N. Decaul, Emmett Sealey, Abdul-Mladi Abdul-Karim, Ghulam Farhad, Audrey A. Belton, Anita L. Alston-Roberts, Zeraida Duprey, Monica Cumberbatch, Ricardo Duperval, Johnbull Ehigiator, Samuel Austin, Cyrlene Y. Barnett, Celeste A. Akulin, Alfred E. Antini, Barbara Fogle, Valentyna Masyk, Oluremi Balogun, Miriam L. Centeno, Enel Etienne, Joyce Bullock, Felix P. Akpona, Anne-Marie David, Creola Atchison, Idayat O. Adeniji, Nia M. Dillion, Tammy Brewer, Kembey Biewan, Michael Camacho, Anibal Allende, Jr, Errol Dicks, Claubel Espirosa, Monique Murray, Stephanie Darrisaw, Debora Brown, Jermaine Bascom, Ademola A. Adesamy, Courtney L. Buckley, Regina M. Butler, Fabio L. Alvarez, Iris D. Bonet, Penniellen Bergholz, Kaliah Bright, Olatunbosun A. Adeagbo, Trevor E. Cofield, Kathleen M. Falokun, Suzette Coles, Darrell D. Dorsey, Nora S. Cameron, Norman E. Bouldine, Darek L. Clark, Daniel Bickram, Kimberley Butler, Cedrie Connell, Richard Arroyo, Wayne Neal, Elizabeth A. Adedeji, Jacquee Elie, Ashley Hamilton, Lizar D. Alexander, Vincent Ejiamire, Allen Stevens, Jannifer Baker, Frank Cabrera, Jasmine McNeill, Christopher R. Bran, Natocha T. Daney, Pranay K. Deb, Franklin J. Fernandez, Susana Diaz. Related document: #28 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Faruk Danmole, Jacquee Elie, Christopher R. Bran, Lizar D. Alexander, Kaliah Bright, Florence Adedoyin, Vadim M. Bishinkevich, Jasmine McNeill, Allston Evans, Daniel Bickram, Kaye L. Allen, Celeste A. Akulin, Regina M. Butler, Ricardo Ford, Norman E. Bouldine, Audrey A. Belton, Errol Dicks, Nicole David, Chevelle K. Bethea, Nora S. Cameron, Robin C. Dickerson, Doritha N. Decaul, Elizabeth A. Adedeji, Claubel Espirosa, Trevor E. Cofield, Debora Brown, Amada Flynn, Okojie I. Ambrose, Leonard Crowley, Kembey Biewan, Nesha Borrero, Ghulam Farhad, Ashley Hamilton, Cynthia El-Ansari, Trevor Crosby, Jamie Easton, Frank Cabrera, Barbara Fogle, Emmett Sealey, Wendell Bowens, Natocha T. Daney, Wendy Anderson, Tammy Brewer, Richard Arroyo, Anne-Marie David, Samantha N. Donaldson, Boris J. Calderon, Paul Singh, Creola Atchison, Felix P. Akpona, Pranay K. Deb, Wayne Neal, Olatunbosun A. Adeagbo, Iris D. Bonet, Vincent Ejiamire, Idayat O. Adeniji, Samuel Austin, Stephanie Darrisaw, Nia M. Dillion, Alfred E. Antini, Courtney L. Buckley, Pelagie Djahoue, Monique Murray, Gloria Brown, Michael Camacho, Johnbull Ehigiator, Nadir Ahmed, Kenneth R. Boatswain, Darek L. Clark, Penniellen Bergholz, Linda M. Browne, Charles Flagg, David Escourse, Kimberley Butler, Lendel Adams, Anibal Allende, Jr., Sadiat Bello-Bakare, Jannifer Baker, Allen Stevens, John C. Chibuzo, Lennard Faustin, Jose A. Balbuena, Enel Etienne, Valentyna Masyk, Benneth Ekwegbalu, Antoine Bolouvi, Terease Butler, Charde Baker, Valencia M. Brown, Cyrlene Y. Barnett, Garry Dulorie, Isaac O. Alao, Jose M. Figueroa, Susana Diaz, Ricardo Duperval, Latish Banks, Rosedi Morales, Cory M. Black, Ademola A. Adesamy, Kikelomo Adedayo, Margaret Cummins, Corey Evans, Erik Giordano, Miriam L. Centeno, Franklin Fenton, Jermaine Bascom, Suzette Coles, Maurice R. Ayala, Gabriel B. Ariwodola, Jocelyne N. Chamblin, Zeraida Duprey, Cedrie Connell, Marilu Alicea, Kofoworola Akimrimisi, Nicole Brown, Darrell D. Dorsey, Terry Bayne, Anita L. Alston-Roberts, Elnora Fludd, Clifford Couloute, Anneliee Almonte, Michael Caldwell, Oluremi Balogun, Kathleen M. Falokun, Franklin J. Fernandez, Artenkah Carswell, Salas Addo, Uloma Enyi, Fabio L. Alvarez, Abdul-Mladi Abdul-Karim, Joyce Bullock, Monica Cumberbatch, Arline L. Brown, Derrick D. Askins, Keisha R. Collins, #1 Complaint, filed by Jasmine McNeill, Ashley Hamilton, Emmett Sealey, Paul Singh, Wayne Neal, Monique Murray, Allen Stevens, Valentyna Masyk, Benneth Ekwegbalu, Rosedi Morales, Erik Giordano. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Pordy, Hope) Modified on 1/11/2017 (pc).
January 9, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Hope Allison Pordy to RE-FILE Document No. #28 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Caption error. Caption cannot state et al unless court ordered. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dgo)
January 6, 2017 Filing 28 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against City of New York, New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Antoine Bolouvi, Kofoworola Akimrimisi, Sadiat Bello-Bakare, Wendy Anderson, Amada Flynn, Cory M. Black, Kikelomo Adedayo, Allston Evans, Leonard Crowley, Lennard Faustin, Marilu Alicea, Margaret Cummins, Maurice R. Ayala, Artenkah Carswell, Nadir Ahmed, Pelagie Djahoue, Michael Caldwell, Erik Giordano, Isaac O. Alao, Derrick D. Askins, Keisha R. Collins, Jose M. Figueroa, Nicole Brown, Elnora Fludd, Latish Banks, Jocelyne N. Chamblin, Gloria Brown, Lendel Adams, Okojie I. Ambrose, Florence Adedoyin, Faruk Danmole, Charles Flagg, Valencia M. Brown, Nesha Borrero, Benneth Ekwegbalu, Uloma Enyi, Salas Addo, Charde Baker, Boris J. Calderon, Ricardo Ford, Nicole David, Cynthia El-Ansari, Arline L. Brown, Jose A. Balbuena, Corey Evans, Robin C. Dickerson, Terease Butler, Garry Dulorie, David Escourse, Linda M. Browne, Gabriel B. Ariwodola, Vadim M. Bishinkevich, Wendell Bowens, Jamie Easton, Chevelle K. Bethea, John C. Chibuzo, Kaye L. Allen, Kenneth R. Boatswain, Clifford Couloute, Trevor Crosby, Samantha N. Donaldson, Paul Singh, Anneliee Almonte, Terry Bayne, Rosedi Morales, Franklin Fenton, Doritha N. Decaul, Emmett Sealey, Abdul-Mladi Abdul-Karim, Ghulam Farhad, Audrey A. Belton, Anita L. Alston-Roberts, Zeraida Duprey, Monica Cumberbatch, Ricardo Duperval, Johnbull Ehigiator, Samuel Austin, Cyrlene Y. Barnett, Celeste A. Akulin, Alfred E. Antini, Barbara Fogle, Valentyna Masyk, Oluremi Balogun, Miriam L. Centeno, Enel Etienne, Joyce Bullock, Felix P. Akpona, Anne-Marie David, Creola Atchison, Idayat O. Adeniji, Nia M. Dillion, Tammy Brewer, Kembey Biewan, Michael Camacho, Anibal Allende, Jr, Errol Dicks, Claubel Espirosa, Monique Murray, Stephanie Darrisaw, Debora Brown, Jermaine Bascom, Ademola A. Adesamy, Courtney L. Buckley, Regina M. Butler, Fabio L. Alvarez, Iris D. Bonet, Penniellen Bergholz, Kaliah Bright, Olatunbosun A. Adeagbo, Trevor E. Cofield, Kathleen M. Falokun, Darrell D. Dorsey, Nora S. Cameron, Norman E. Bouldine, Darek L. Clark, Daniel Bickram, Kimberley Butler, Cedrie Connell, Richard Arroyo, Wayne Neal, Elizabeth A. Adedeji, Jacquee Elie, Ashley Hamilton, Lizar D. Alexander, Vincent Ejiamire, Allen Stevens, Jannifer Baker, Frank Cabrera, Jasmine McNeill, Christopher R. Bran, Natocha T. Daney, Pranay K. Deb, Franklin J. Fernandez, Susana Diaz, Suzette Coles. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Rosedi Morales, Ashley Hamilton, Monique Murray, Wayne Neal, Allen Stevens, Jasmine McNeill, Emmett Sealey, Valentyna Masyk, Benneth Ekwegbalu, Paul Singh, Erik Giordano. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Pordy, Hope) Modified on 1/9/2017 (dgo).
December 22, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/6/2017. Motions due by 2/3/2017. Responses due by 2/17/2017 Replies due by 2/28/2017. (cf)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #23 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Plaintiffs may amend their Complaint by January 6, 2017. Defendant(s) may file their motion to dismiss by February 3, 2017. Plaintiff(s) shall respond to the motion by February 17, 2017. Any reply by defendant(s) shall be filed by February 28, 2017. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/22/2016) (cf)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Any motion to amend or join additional parties shall be filed within the time set in paragraph 3 in a separate order of this date. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than June 16, 2017. All expert discovery shall be completed by 7/31/17. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 5-7 days. The next Case Management Conference is scheduled for July 7, 2017 at 11 am. (As further set forth in this Order.) Fact Discovery due by 6/16/2017. Expert Discovery due by 7/31/2017. Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/22/2016) (cf)
December 22, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/22/2016. Next conference is scheduled for July 7, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. (Nacanther, Florence)
December 19, 2016 Filing 25 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 12/19/2016 re: Response to Defendant's December 14, 2016 Pre-Motion Letter (Motion to Dismiss). Document filed by Monique Murray.(McGillivary, Gregory)
December 15, 2016 Filing 24 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 12/15/2016 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Monique Murray.(McGillivary, Gregory)
December 14, 2016 Filing 23 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File motion to dismiss addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Kamen, Garrett)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #20 Letter, filed by Monique Murray. ENDORSEMENT: All requests to file motion will be taken up at the December 22, conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/9/2016) (mro)
December 6, 2016 Filing 21 RESPONSE re: #20 Letter, Plaintiffs' Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Kamen, Garrett)
December 5, 2016 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 12/5/2016 re: Pre-Motion Letter (Motion for Conditional Certification and Notice to Putative Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b)). Document filed by Monique Murray.(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 14, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: City of New York, New York answer due 12/14/2016. (mro)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting #18 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. Conference adjourned from December 13 to Dec 22, 2016 at 10:30 am. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 12/22/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/14/2016) (mro)
November 11, 2016 Filing 18 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel., CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initial Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Kamen, Garrett)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Diana J. Nobile to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Gregory K. McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.)
November 4, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Diana J. Nobile to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12953716. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #14 MOTION for Gregory K. McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12953660. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 4, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION for Diana J. Nobile to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12953716. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Monique Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nobile, Diana)
November 4, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION for Gregory K. McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12953660. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Monique Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McGillivary, Gregory)
October 25, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hope Allison Pordy on behalf of Abdul-Mladi Abdul-Karim, Lendel Adams, Salas Addo, Olatunbosun A. Adeagbo, Kikelomo Adedayo, Elizabeth A. Adedeji, Florence Adedoyin, Idayat O. Adeniji, Ademola A. Adesamy, Nadir Ahmed, Kofoworola Akimrimisi, Felix P. Akpona, Celeste A. Akulin, Isaac O. Alao, Lizar D. Alexander, Marilu Alicea, Kaye L. Allen, Anibal Allende, Jr, Anneliee Almonte, Anita L. Alston-Roberts, Fabio L. Alvarez, Okojie I. Ambrose, Wendy Anderson, Alfred E. Antini, Gabriel B. Ariwodola, Richard Arroyo, Derrick D. Askins, Creola Atchison, Samuel Austin, Maurice R. Ayala, Charde Baker, Jannifer Baker, Jose A. Balbuena, Oluremi Balogun, Latish Banks, Cyrlene Y. Barnett, Jermaine Bascom, Terry Bayne, Sadiat Bello-Bakare, Audrey A. Belton, Penniellen Bergholz, Chevelle K. Bethea, Daniel Bickram, Kembey Biewan, Vadim M. Bishinkevich, Cory M. Black, Kenneth R. Boatswain, Antoine Bolouvi, Iris D. Bonet, Nesha Borrero, Norman E. Bouldine, Wendell Bowens, Christopher R. Bran, Tammy Brewer, Kaliah Bright, Arline L. Brown, Debora Brown, Gloria Brown, Nicole Brown, Valencia M. Brown, Linda M. Browne, Courtney L. Buckley, Joyce Bullock, Kimberley Butler, Regina M. Butler, Terease Butler, Frank Cabrera, Boris J. Calderon, Michael Caldwell, Michael Camacho, Nora S. Cameron, Artenkah Carswell, Miriam L. Centeno, Jocelyne N. Chamblin, John C. Chibuzo, Darek L. Clark, Trevor E. Cofield, Keisha R. Collins, Cedrie Connell, Clifford Couloute, Trevor Crosby, Leonard Crowley, Monica Cumberbatch, Margaret Cummins, Natocha T. Daney, Faruk Danmole, Stephanie Darrisaw, Anne-Marie David, Nicole David, Pranay K. Deb, Doritha N. Decaul, Susana Diaz, Robin C. Dickerson, Errol Dicks, Nia M. Dillion, Pelagie Djahoue, Samantha N. Donaldson, Darrell D. Dorsey, Garry Dulorie, Ricardo Duperval, Zeraida Duprey, Jamie Easton, Johnbull Ehigiator, Vincent Ejiamire, Benneth Ekwegbalu, Cynthia El-Ansari, Jacquee Elie, Uloma Enyi, David Escourse, Claubel Espirosa, Enel Etienne, Allston Evans, Corey Evans, Kathleen M. Falokun, Ghulam Farhad, Lennard Faustin, Franklin Fenton, Franklin J. Fernandez, Jose M. Figueroa, Charles Flagg, Elnora Fludd, Amada Flynn, Barbara Fogle, Ricardo Ford, Erik Giordano, Ashley Hamilton, Valentyna Masyk, Jasmine McNeill, Rosedi Morales, Monique Murray, Wayne Neal, Emmett Sealey, Paul Singh, Allen Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A)(Pordy, Hope)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/13/2016 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/25/2016) (cla)
October 25, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of of Filing Consent to Join Forms. Document filed by Benneth Ekwegbalu, Erik Giordano, Ashley Hamilton, Valentyna Masyk, Jasmine McNeill, Rosedi Morales, Monique Murray, Wayne Neal, Emmett Sealey, Paul Singh, Allen Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pordy, Hope)
October 25, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE of of Filing Consent to Join Forms. Document filed by Benneth Ekwegbalu, Erik Giordano, Ashley Hamilton, Valentyna Masyk, Jasmine McNeill, Rosedi Morales, Monique Murray, Wayne Neal, Emmett Sealey, Paul Singh, Allen Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pordy, Hope)
October 25, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE of of Filing Consent to Join Forms. Document filed by Benneth Ekwegbalu, Erik Giordano, Ashley Hamilton, Valentyna Masyk, Jasmine McNeill, Rosedi Morales, Monique Murray, Wayne Neal, Emmett Sealey, Paul Singh, Allen Stevens, Abdul-Mladi Abdul-Karim, Lendel Adams, Salas Addo, Olatunbosun A. Adeagbo, Kikelomo Adedayo, Elizabeth A. Adedeji, Florence Adedoyin, Idayat O. Adeniji, Ademola A. Adesamy, Nadir Ahmed, Kofoworola Akimrimisi, Felix P. Akpona, Celeste A. Akulin, Isaac O. Alao, Lizar D. Alexander, Marilu Alicea, Kaye L. Allen, Anibal Allende, Jr, Anneliee Almonte, Anita L. Alston-Roberts, Fabio L. Alvarez, Okojie I. Ambrose, Wendy Anderson, Alfred E. Antini, Gabriel B. Ariwodola, Richard Arroyo, Derrick D. Askins, Creola Atchison, Samuel Austin, Maurice R. Ayala, Charde Baker, Jannifer Baker, Jose A. Balbuena, Oluremi Balogun, Latish Banks, Cyrlene Y. Barnett, Jermaine Bascom, Terry Bayne, Sadiat Bello-Bakare, Audrey A. Belton, Penniellen Bergholz, Chevelle K. Bethea, Daniel Bickram, Kembey Biewan, Vadim M. Bishinkevich, Cory M. Black, Kenneth R. Boatswain, Antoine Bolouvi, Iris D. Bonet, Nesha Borrero, Norman E. Bouldine, Wendell Bowens, Christopher R. Bran, Tammy Brewer, Kaliah Bright, Arline L. Brown, Debora Brown, Gloria Brown, Nicole Brown, Valencia M. Brown, Linda M. Browne, Courtney L. Buckley, Joyce Bullock, Kimberley Butler, Regina M. Butler, Terease Butler, Frank Cabrera, Boris J. Calderon, Michael Caldwell, Michael Camacho, Nora S. Cameron, Artenkah Carswell, Miriam L. Centeno, Jocelyne N. Chamblin, John C. Chibuzo, Darek L. Clark, Trevor E. Cofield, Keisha R. Collins, Cedrie Connell, Clifford Couloute, Trevor Crosby, Leonard Crowley, Monica Cumberbatch, Margaret Cummins, Natocha T. Daney, Faruk Danmole, Stephanie Darrisaw, Anne-Marie David, Nicole David, Pranay K. Deb, Doritha N. Decaul, Susana Diaz, Robin C. Dickerson, Errol Dicks, Nia M. Dillion, Pelagie Djahoue, Samantha N. Donaldson, Darrell D. Dorsey, Garry Dulorie, Ricardo Duperval, Zeraida Duprey, Jamie Easton, Johnbull Ehigiator, Vincent Ejiamire, Cynthia El-Ansari, Jacquee Elie, Uloma Enyi, David Escourse, Claubel Espirosa, Enel Etienne, Allston Evans, Corey Evans, Kathleen M. Falokun, Ghulam Farhad, Lennard Faustin, Franklin Fenton, Franklin J. Fernandez, Jose M. Figueroa, Charles Flagg, Elnora Fludd, Amada Flynn, Barbara Fogle, Ricardo Ford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pordy, Hope)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for David William Ricksecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.)
October 20, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for David William Ricksecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12896764. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 20, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Michelle Block on behalf of Benneth Ekwegbalu, Erik Giordano, Ashley Hamilton, Valentyna Masyk, Jasmine McNeill, Rosedi Morales, Monique Murray, Wayne Neal, Emmett Sealey, Paul Singh, Allen Stevens. (Block, Sarah)
October 20, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION for David William Ricksecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12896764. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Benneth Ekwegbalu, Erik Giordano, Ashley Hamilton, Valentyna Masyk, Jasmine McNeill, Rosedi Morales, Monique Murray, Wayne Neal, Emmett Sealey, Paul Singh, Allen Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricksecker, David)
October 18, 2016 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York, New York. (rch)
October 17, 2016 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Benneth Ekwegbalu, Erik Giordano, Ashley Hamilton, Valentyna Masyk, Jasmine McNeill, Rosedi Morales, Monique Murray, Wayne Neal, Emmett Sealey, Paul Singh, Allen Stevens. (Pordy, Hope)
October 17, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Caption title and party name on the summons must match what is listed on the complaint caption title. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
October 17, 2016 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 17, 2016 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. (pc)
October 17, 2016 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
October 17, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Hope Allison Pordy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: City Of New York. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pc)
October 14, 2016 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Benneth Ekwegbalu, Erik Giordano, Ashley Hamilton, Valentyna Masyk, Jasmine McNeill, Rosedi Morales, Monique Murray, Wayne Neal, Emmett Sealey, Paul Singh, Allen Stevens. (Pordy, Hope) Modified on 10/17/2016 (pc).
October 14, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Pordy, Hope)
October 14, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City Of New York. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12875393)Document filed by Wayne Neal, Erik Giordano, Ashley Hamilton, Emmett Sealey, Allen Stevens, Benneth Ekwegbalu, Paul Singh, Jasmine McNeill, Monique Murray, Valentyna Masyk, Rosedi Morales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pordy, Hope)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray et al v. City Of New York, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susana Diaz
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Radford
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Rodriguez
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Neal
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terease Butler
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita L. Alston-Roberts
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Santiago
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doressa Sweeting
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salas Addo
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Chibuzo
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen M. Falokun
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareem McCray
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amada Flynn
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enel Etienne
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Charles
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Crosby
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Salley
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Singh
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jannifer Baker
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashon Allen-Owens
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin C. Dickerson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris D. Bonet
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morning Williams
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chitra Harris
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynold Piquant
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman E. Bouldine
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debora Brown
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Flagg
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathlyn Roach
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Cumberbatch
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Escourse
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory M. Black
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eulit Miller
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Ford
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Young
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Bracey
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milous Johnson
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Anderson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Rodriguez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Chen-Reid
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Miller
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garry Dulorie
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Balbuena
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Okojie I. Ambrose
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delphina Lewis
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha R. Collins
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra McCoy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Kolmkova
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valencia M. Brown
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiecha Merritt
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Stevens
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Brown
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Huddivant
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Thompson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vadim M. Bishinkevich
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeraida Duprey
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Pabon
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Flament
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne-Marie David
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evon Reyes
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix P. Akpona
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kikelomo Adedayo
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Errol McNaught
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Taylor
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Brewer
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabio L. Alvarez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmot Reedy
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia Jennings
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ghulam Farhad
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole David
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Hamilton
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam L. Centeno
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly St. Hill
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kembey Biewan
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Jack
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Udoh Arit
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natocha T. Daney
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Martinez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Darrisaw
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha N. Donaldson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venair Heyward
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence Adedoyin
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mireille Vital
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oneka Fordyce
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilu Alicea
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oluremi Balogun
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yeudy Villalona
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine McNeill
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor E. Cofield
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney L. Buckley
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utilde Charles
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penniellen Bergholz
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clive Phillip
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Richards
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquee Elie
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Couloute
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Davis
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynette McDonald
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nia M. Dillion
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Bascom
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bickram
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artenkah Carswell
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnbull Ehigiator
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sha Li Huang
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Nedd
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Gomez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberley Butler
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odetta Jervis
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charde Baker
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Matos
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayra Rodriguez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chadwick Beauford
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdul-Mladi Abdul-Karim
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliette Quoquoi
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste A. Akulin
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Smith
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Johnson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora S. Cameron
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Coleman
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darek L. Clark
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anneliee Almonte
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin J. Fernandez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Bowden
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Rose
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jefferson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Cabrera
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Rodriguez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Murray
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Sara Lyn Faulman
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: William Li
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Represented By: Hillary Lebeau
Represented By: Diana J. Nobile
Represented By: Afroz Baig
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Nicholas James Johnson
Represented By: Molly Ann Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ademola A. Adesamy
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadir Ahmed
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Caldwell
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hermenegildo Rodriguez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Adedeji
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chima Dimoriaku
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadiat Bello-Bakare
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Colon-Ortiz
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pranay K. Deb
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzette Coles
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionne Handricks
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshann Willis
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Camacho
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Farrow
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Robinson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Fogle
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Figueroa
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Corporan Cintron
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claubel Espirosa
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey A. Belton
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olatunbosun A. Adeagbo
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gisselle Cassanora
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elba Cruz-Toribico
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lendel Adams
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Chauncey
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yanet Diaz-Flores
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Williams Jr.
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arline L. Brown
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia El-Ansari
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latish Banks
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Ogunleye
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Bowens
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne St. Hill
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hubert Caleb
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Callender
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanelle Small
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constantina Cifu
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyrlene Y. Barnett
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidiya Khenkina
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giselle Marks
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pelagie Djahoue
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Ejiamire
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedrie Connell
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Errol Dicks
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magalie Amlicar
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Finley
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kofoworola Akimrimisi
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chevelle K. Bethea
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Cummins
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ifeyinwa Okeya
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel B. Ariwodola
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Avery
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Germaine Stewart
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Brown
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Bayne
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Gordon
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice R. Ayala
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nesha Borrero
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Bullock
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Althea Dickson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmett Sealey
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Arroyo
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kerlcula
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Latimer
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher R. Bran
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalaine Sumpter
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benneth Ekwegbalu
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherise Armstrong
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karlene Garrick
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elnora Fludd
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Boatswain
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uloma Enyi
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosedi Morales
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Duperval
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Giordano
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentyna Masyk
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Kellar
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allston Evans
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Crowley
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Evans
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell D. Dorsey
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Dyce
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizar D. Alexander
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreatha Williams
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaliah Bright
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred E. Antini
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick D. Askins
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaye L. Allen
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Brown
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jocelyne N. Chamblin
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Bolouvi
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hernol Amen Rah
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac O. Alao
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lennard Faustin
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Aiyanyo
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faruk Danmole
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda M. Browne
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boris J. Calderon
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anibal Allende, Jr.
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idayat O. Adeniji
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory A. Scott
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jani Cauthen
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina M. Butler
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Johnson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Austin
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Williams
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kayode
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Easton
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creola Atchison
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Fenton
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doritha N. Decaul
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Jackson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York, New York
Represented By: John Corbin Carter
Represented By: Andrea Mary O'Connor
Represented By: Garrett Scott Kamen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?