Williams v. City of New York
Plaintiff: Williams, Valerie Ferguson, Marie Taluy, Marianne Whitfield, Cynthia Franco, Natarsky Louissaint, Alison Matthew, Samantha Grant, Quran Hall, Melinda Algarin, Lisa Rodriguez, Felisa Hurst, Malika Gresham, Yolanda Jones, Mtonya Fletcher, Lorna Chambers, Bosede Otulaja, Ailsa Stiell, Ishmael Essiem, Edwige Williams, Lois Dobbs-Rose, Lorna Bailey, Sheldeane Gooding, Jessica Prudencio, Yvette Brickhouse, Tracy Oxilas, Racquel Ritch, Fritz Balan, Uhura Carter, Sharon Charles, Ralene Caton, Cesarina Bello, Sybil Blaize-Smith, Marina Falconi, Noelia Perez, Mary Glynn, Suhaiylah Warner, Andrew Robert Blake, Kehinde Adebo, Lorna Brown, Caroline Amaobi, Zackary M Logan, Adrianne Fernandez, Florence Awotoye, Arthurene Baugh, Joy Headley, Akunna Chizoma Osuagwu, Jessica Leibel, Sasha Dawson, John Patrissi, Margaret Green, William McComb, Jessica Hance, Shakima Renee, Edward Santos, Derricka Gritten, Ingrid Wilkins, Candace Coleman, Zena Marks, Shavarra Dudley-Ruffin, Caryl Trocard, Charmaine McDonald, Edward Appiah-Gyasi, Renee Barton, Betty Cruz, Marie Skyers, Jeannette Jack, Judith Herrera, Valerie Jean-Henry, Theophilus Bey, Lindsay Flaverney, Jenine Kishun, Chervon McClelland, Jeffrey Yuille, Jerma Peter, Crystal Dorsey, Mark Turner, Kristi Cook, Kim Crocker, Cameo Christian, Melanie Velez, Sherisse Baptiste, Anthony Caguioa, Lesa Hamilton, Dwight Delmhorst, Renee Hull, Lillian Hicks, Yulonde Edwards, Katherine Quiles, Muhammad Bello, Maria Guzman, Shareem Evans, Crystal Espaillat, Vilma Mendoza, Arlene Hipp, Jose Molina, Latisha Samuels, Farhana Afroze, Belinda Vega, Helene Marcel, Akintunji Akinyemi, Michael Chasan, Tamara Douglas-Juba, Cheryl Gilchrest-Ray, Marie Renelus-Wray, Krashawn Lee, Donald Guercin, Julie Demadet, Idoline Genus, Brittin Loewy, Qiana Ross-Figueroa, Monique Winslow, Clarice Robinson, Andrea Derrell, Cheryl Bowman, Seannette Vaughan, Shaneese Carlton, Honora Thompson, Syndia Semexant, Daphne St. Valliere, Portia Woods, Robin Galloway, Rose Johnson, LaShawn Aris, Shemroy Haynes, Kenesha Turner, Donette Olivier, Jenai Faulk, Danielle Cook, Rachelle Jackson, Kolawole Omoladune, Alysia Jones, Kirsten George, Analida Stewart, Marina Gomez, Corinda Fleming, Stella Combet, Amanda Alexander, Marcia Holness, Kawan Inman, Catiana Day, Lidia Leon, Nina Evans, Almaz Forsythe, Jacqueline Coleman, Angus Cuffy, Wynsome Slocombe, Nuvia Velasquez, Gisselle Marte, Nikia Smith, Davina Maddux, Barbara Famosa, Jultilde Charles, Roberto Mortimer, Solangel Saunders, Sophia Smith-James, Edoll Chance-Bullen, Jazman Hill, Aja Murray, Patricia Duncan, Modupe Abdul, Azzurdee Southerland, Matthew Shodolamu, Tiffany Jack, Ronnie Ford, Sherri Wright, Kareen Goss, Lakkiyah Hutchinson, Sara Graves, Alexie Talbott, Miralle Charles, Paul Alejandro, June Clarke, Lori Gooden, Erica Pitts, Diana Perez, Marilyn Lovell, Alphonso Blake, Philomena Mulzac, Celeste Rivera, ShaQuanna Sterling, Greta Cornwall, Melissa Ortiz, Aneisha Green, Alicia Gilkes, Mayra DePena, Daniel Knuckles, Shreshtha Ramsumair, Maria Felix, Davida Adams, Mario Ortiz, Marlene Melo, Hilary Reid, Tiffane Martin-Lucas, Stacey Sandoval, Jenevie Pascall, Kechipetronilla Simon-Ebughu, Nancy Adolphe, Sherisse Rogers, Jacqueline Williams, Deidre Queeley, Neville Clayton, Linda Lampone, Frieda King, Isolene Holder, Toronda Hayes, Patsy Bruton, Leslie Smith, Diane Mendicino, Jiselle Lorde, Vanessa Harris, Daria Dietz, Jacqueline Brissett, Adel Benjamin, Mavernie Lilly, Tracy Neale, Januarie Joubert, Angelberth Ezeogu, Sherley Albert, Audrey Rivers, Gene-Clairie Saint-Ulysse, Cassandra Gary, Suhura Bernard, Yannique-Gail Maria Coleman, Cynthia Lundi, Natocha Anfant, Dorinda Braxton, Derrick Pascall, Tyeisha Deas, Jessica Roa, Tenneshia Streete, Josianne Joseph-Mothersil, Melly Bello, Laura McFarlan, Tiffany Douglas, Heather Emmanuel, Jamie Albert, Nichole Stuart, Alexis Rosado, Janet Ramos, Nyra Garner, Ritza Falcon-Santiago, Keisha Vaughan, Richard Stockner, Leroy Carty, Tawana Jean-Baptiste, Phyllis Johnson, Kristal Daniels, Vivian Finney, Cherie Hinds, Linda Seppy, Tanya Perry, Ishakeya Hayden, Stacey Robinson, Shelley Williams, Karlene Brown, Anne Idowu, Shelley Ann Walker, Peter Bentevis, Jennifer Cobrand, Lauren Goodwin, Latanya McCain, Racquel McIntosh, Gillian Perez, Jessy Vargas, Vanessa Williams, Melanie Alves, Sheila Bennett, Shakia Yelder-Pearson, Candis Hoyte-Williams, Jasmine Rivera, Najah Lewis, Chevelle Brown, Jannie Benton-Reddick, Erica Pagan, Genine Johnson, Rachel Haynes, Arlene Archer-Lewis, Dorothy Cervero, Dwayne Nealy, Belisa Nieves, Grace McKay, Patrice Goburn, Georgia Inegbenebo, Haydee Gorris, Demarie Urdaz, Vanessa Thompson, Kalellia Hamilton, Donna Brown, Avinash Maharaj, Nisaa Greenley, Henry Gomez, Bernadette Whaley, Sandra Rodriguez, Justyna Poltorak, Sharice Scott, Shantae Dukes, Sheila Ralling, Bridget Nwogu, Shawn Knight, Florence Otasowie, Carlos Fernandez, Walid Ghaus, Lynetta Lipsey-Hughes, Juanita Bell, Judine Steele, Jadai Wilson, Marie Vilus, Evelyn Herrera, Omisha Morgan, Wesley Boone, Albert-Ann Benjamin, Tammy Dumay, Sharon Belizairo, Michelle Johnson, Vernese Larrier, Elizabeth McGivney, Alice Duarte, Sheniqua Simon, Mariela Sanchez, Iasia Tyre, Anthony Midgett, Durell Morris, Monique Dorsett, Dana Waiters, Lisa Holmes, Margarita Yusufova, Anika Peaster, Sharon Maxwell, Heather Awer, Eula Blake, Theresa Thomson, Katiana McNish-Crut, LaToya Greene, Surayya Rogers, Anne-Marie Edreira, Abigail Watkins, Brian Kehoe, Sonya Leach, Jamal Williams, Danyelle Moore, Conrad Seivwright, Patricia Martucci, Khadiya Abdul-Mayid, Janice Pemberton, Tahisia Duckett, Chet Williams, Andrea Murphy, Coleen Montague, Shaquana Cole, Jennifer James, Wanda Tolliver, Monifa Scafe, Judith Wilson, Jeremiah Nalls, Myriam Castro, Monique Bristol, Kedra Collins, Robert Suozzo, Jo-Vanne Baskerville, Massiel Knight, Gedline Lincifort, Dorothea Gray, Asha Kenion, Adeleen Rivera, Khan Morshed, Olusola Karimu, Rebecca Payne, Jennifer Bordes, Khalilah Griffiths, Daina Foster, LaShawn Garner, Maricelis DeJesus, Angelique Rivera, Monica Pinto, Tiffany Gentle, Melissa Stagg, Kolawoe Kareem, Brenda Howard-Boyce, Alaba Adelaja, Tywana Jackson, Debbie Samuel, Suzette Campbell, Aprila Johnson, Michael Jones, Natacha Nelson, Na'eema Robinson, Frank Charmaine, Caridad Taylor, Jonathan Aguilera, Yalya Sirotin, Tiffany Toussaint, Latisha Reed, Evett Ricketts, Danielle Jurkuwicz, Shanelle Long, Antoine Farrar, Jennifer Koppelman, Angelina Dawson, Theresa Price, Flore St. Aime, Ila McCall, Carlotta Ofield, Shamika Shaheed, Harvey Ogun, Lydia Hyatt, Ayanna Ambris, Lesceene Ricketts, Monique Edwards, Iydes Ramirez, Tracey McCreath, Kara Ostwind, Marsha Skeen, Albania Henry, Melissa Cham, Myrtle Green, Ivis Vasquez, Jo Ann Sexton, Betzaida Colon, Charmain Farrar, Sheryl Nedd, Nathalie Mendes, Chebby Smith, Gizelle Roland, Zenie Singleton, Shirleen Stewart, Cecily Francis, Melissa Browne, Michael Bowens, Keisha Martinez, Desterneen Williams, Janice Johnson, Jill Campbell, Carmen Polanco, Michael Davis, Valerie Bell, Farah Joby, La-Starr Davis, Michelle Diaz, Leslie Ramsay, Twana Little, Francesca Saraniero, Louise Sherlock, Brenda Mayo, Sandra Wofford, Boniface Ikemenoagu, Amenda Bunch, Sharon Frank, Darrell Subryan, Basil Hall, Aja Undly, Felix Dumay, Daria Edwards, Shanequa Brown, Melissa Hayes, Sharon Goldberg, Valerie Belton, Nichole Goodridge, Cynthia McDonald, Lawrence Sari, Danna Purnell, Shelly Kirshenbaum, Kadisha Serrano, Tamara Johnson, Melissa Hough, Yvonne Cooper, Germaine Woods, Adela Alvarez, Trisha Blair, Karla Caceres, Kenson DeBique, Shaquanna Clark, Ceceila Sheppard, Marsha Laventure, Ellie Franklin-Senat, Dottia Lewis, Everett Wattley, Jordan Evans, Tiffany Garland, Tyesha Capers, Avery Spearman, Frenel Elysee, Elianny Bonilla-Arzu, Carol Wilson, Francine Allman, Nichola Martin, Chanel Stokes, Donna West, Andrea Avent, Adrienne Bostic-Cush, Tamara Battle, Sharon Reed, Bolade Begho, Miriam Vazquez, Nakiema Hodges, Colette Chapman, Janelle Benjamin, Ivette Espinoza, Rina Alcantara, Aron Piron, Kisha Scott-Phillips, Marc Williams, Dora Akhazeta and Bobbie Phillips
Defendant: City of New York
Case Number: 1:2016cv08671
Filed: November 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 207
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 37 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Zackary M Logan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(McGillivary, Gregory)
January 23, 2020 Filing 36 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Andrew Robert Blake. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
January 17, 2020 Filing 35 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Yannique-Gail Maria Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 12, 2019 Filing 34 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Akunna Chizoma Osuagwu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
August 29, 2019 Filing 33 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Angelina Dawson, Ellie Franklin-Senat, Kolawoe Kareem, Debbie Samuel, Shelley Williams, Margarita Yusufova. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
April 12, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Diana J. Nobile on behalf of Jacqueline Williams. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Nobile, Diana)
April 12, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sarah Michelle Block on behalf of Jacqueline Williams. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Block, Sarah)
April 12, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Gregory Keith McGillivary on behalf of Jacqueline Williams. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (McGillivary, Gregory)
October 16, 2018 Filing 29 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jo-Vanne Baskerville, Paul Alejandro, Adel Benjamin, Frank Charmaine, Khan Morshed, Janet Ramos, Jamal Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
May 17, 2017 Filing 28 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Farhana Afroze, Lindsay Flaverney, Toronda Hayes, Latanya McCain, Charmaine McDonald, Matthew Shodolamu, Sheniqua Simon, Chanel Stokes, Portia Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
March 23, 2017 Filing 27 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Nancy Adolphe, Heather Awer, Renee Barton, Arthurene Baugh, Shaneese Carlton, Melissa Cham, Colette Chapman, Julie Demadet, Tiffany Douglas, Tiffany Gentle, Idoline Genus, Walid Ghaus, Melissa Hayes, Arlene Hipp, Farah Joby, Olusola Karimu, Vernese Larrier, Marsha Laventure, Cynthia Lundi, Alison Matthew, Racquel McIntosh, Omisha Morgan, Andrea Murphy, Mario Ortiz, Kara Ostwind, Rebecca Payne, Bobbie Phillips, Sherisse Rogers, Kisha Scott-Phillips, Wynsome Slocombe, Sophia Smith-James, Kenesha Turner, Miriam Vazquez, Belinda Vega, Nuvia Velasquez, Marie Vilus, Dana Waiters, Ingrid Wilkins, Carol Wilson, Monique Winslow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #25 Letter filed by Jacqueline Williams. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/8/2017) (cf)
March 8, 2017 Case Stayed (cf)
March 7, 2017 Filing 25 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 3/7/2017 re: Joint Proposal to Stay Case. Document filed by Jacqueline Williams.(McGillivary, Gregory)
January 20, 2017 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by City of New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
January 20, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Simeon Gross on behalf of City of New York. (Gross, Adam)
January 20, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Katherine Hook on behalf of City of New York. (Hook, Sarah)
January 20, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Felice B. Ekelman on behalf of City of New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #4 Motion for Diana Nobile to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/8/2016) (cf)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #3 Motion for Gregory McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/8/2016) (cf)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. City of New York answer due 1/20/2017. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/2/2016) (kl)
December 1, 2016 Filing 17 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Andrea O'Connor dated December 1, 2016. Document filed by City of New York.(O'Connor, Andrea)
December 1, 2016 Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (wb)
December 1, 2016 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
December 1, 2016 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:14-cv-04142-PGG-JCF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
November 29, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrea Mary O'Connor on behalf of City of New York. (O'Connor, Andrea)
November 21, 2016 Filing 15 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Modupe Abdul, Khadiya Abdul-Mayid, Davida Adams, Kehinde Adebo, Alaba Adelaja, Jonathan Aguilera, Dora Akhazeta, Akintunji Akinyemi, Jamie Albert, Sherley Albert, Rina Alcantara, Amanda Alexander, Melinda Algarin, Francine Allman, Adela Alvarez, Melanie Alves, Caroline Amaobi, Ayanna Ambris, Natocha Anfant, Edward Appiah-Gyasi, Arlene Archer-Lewis, LaShawn Aris, Andrea Avent, Florence Awotoye, Lorna Bailey, Fritz Balan, Sherisse Baptiste, Tamara Battle, Bolade Begho, Sharon Belizairo, Juanita Bell, Valerie Bell, Cesarina Bello, Melly Bello, Muhammad Bello, Valerie Belton, Albert-Ann Benjamin, Janelle Benjamin, Sheila Bennett, Peter Bentevis, Jannie Benton-Reddick, Suhura Bernard, Theophilus Bey, Trisha Blair, Sybil Blaize-Smith, Alphonso Blake, Eula Blake, Elianny Bonilla-Arzu, Wesley Boone, Jennifer Bordes, Adrienne Bostic-Cush, Michael Bowens, Cheryl Bowman, Dorinda Braxton, Yvette Brickhouse, Jacqueline Brissett, Monique Bristol, Chevelle Brown, Donna Brown, Karlene Brown, Lorna Brown, Shanequa Brown, Melissa Browne, Patsy Bruton, Amenda Bunch, Karla Caceres, Anthony Caguioa, Jill Campbell, Suzette Campbell, Tyesha Capers, Uhura Carter, Leroy Carty, Myriam Castro, Ralene Caton, Dorothy Cervero, Lorna Chambers, Edoll Chance-Bullen, Jultilde Charles, Miralle Charles, Sharon Charles, Michael Chasan, Cameo Christian, Shaquanna Clark, June Clarke, Neville Clayton, Jennifer Cobrand, Shaquana Cole, Candace Coleman, Jacqueline Coleman, Kedra Collins, Betzaida Colon, Stella Combet, Danielle Cook, Kristi Cook, Yvonne Cooper, Greta Cornwall, Kim Crocker, Betty Cruz, Angus Cuffy, Kristal Daniels, La-Starr Davis, Michael Davis, Sasha Dawson, Catiana Day, Kenson DeBique, Maricelis DeJesus, Mayra DePena, Tyeisha Deas, Dwight Delmhorst, Andrea Derrell, Michelle Diaz, Daria Dietz, Lois Dobbs-Rose, Monique Dorsett, Crystal Dorsey, Tamara Douglas-Juba, Alice Duarte, Tahisia Duckett, Shavarra Dudley-Ruffin, Shantae Dukes, Felix Dumay, Tammy Dumay, Patricia Duncan, Anne-Marie Edreira, Daria Edwards, Monique Edwards, Yulonde Edwards, Frenel Elysee, Heather Emmanuel, Crystal Espaillat, Ivette Espinoza, Ishmael Essiem, Jordan Evans, Nina Evans, Shareem Evans, Angelberth Ezeogu, Ritza Falcon-Santiago, Marina Falconi, Barbara Famosa, Antoine Farrar, Charmain Farrar, Jenai Faulk, Maria Felix, Valerie Ferguson, Adrianne Fernandez, Carlos Fernandez, Vivian Finney, Corinda Fleming, Mtonya Fletcher, Ronnie Ford, Almaz Forsythe, Daina Foster, Cecily Francis, Cynthia Franco, Sharon Frank, Robin Galloway, Tiffany Garland, LaShawn Garner, Nyra Garner, Cassandra Gary, Kirsten George, Cheryl Gilchrest-Ray, Alicia Gilkes, Mary Glynn, Patrice Goburn, Sharon Goldberg, Henry Gomez, Marina Gomez, Lori Gooden, Sheldeane Gooding, Nichole Goodridge, Lauren Goodwin, Haydee Gorris, Kareen Goss, Samantha Grant, Sara Graves, Dorothea Gray, Aneisha Green, Margaret Green, Myrtle Green, LaToya Greene, Nisaa Greenley, Malika Gresham, Khalilah Griffiths, Derricka Gritten, Donald Guercin, Maria Guzman, Basil Hall, Quran Hall, Kalellia Hamilton, Lesa Hamilton, Jessica Hance, Vanessa Harris, Ishakeya Hayden, Rachel Haynes, Shemroy Haynes, Joy Headley, Albania Henry, Evelyn Herrera, Judith Herrera, Lillian Hicks, Jazman Hill, Cherie Hinds, Nakiema Hodges, Isolene Holder, Lisa Holmes, Marcia Holness, Melissa Hough, Brenda Howard-Boyce, Candis Hoyte-Williams, Renee Hull, Felisa Hurst, Lakkiyah Hutchinson, Lydia Hyatt, Anne Idowu, Boniface Ikemenoagu, Georgia Inegbenebo, Kawan Inman, Jeannette Jack, Tiffany Jack, Rachelle Jackson, Tywana Jackson, Jennifer James, Tawana Jean-Baptiste, Valerie Jean-Henry, Aprila Johnson, Genine Johnson, Janice Johnson, Michelle Johnson, Phyllis Johnson, Rose Johnson, Tamara Johnson, Alysia Jones, Michael Jones, Yolanda Jones, Josianne Joseph-Mothersil, Januarie Joubert, Danielle Jurkuwicz, Brian Kehoe, Asha Kenion, Frieda King, Shelly Kirshenbaum, Jenine Kishun, Massiel Knight, Shawn Knight, Daniel Knuckles, Jennifer Koppelman, Linda Lampone, Sonya Leach, Krashawn Lee, Jessica Leibel, Lidia Leon, Dottia Lewis, Najah Lewis, Mavernie Lilly, Gedline Lincifort, Lynetta Lipsey-Hughes, Twana Little, Brittin Loewy, Shanelle Long, Jiselle Lorde, Natarsky Louissaint, Marilyn Lovell, Davina Maddux, Avinash Maharaj, Helene Marcel, Zena Marks, Gisselle Marte, Nichola Martin, Tiffane Martin-Lucas, Keisha Martinez, Patricia Martucci, Sharon Maxwell, Brenda Mayo, Ila McCall, Chervon McClelland, William McComb, Tracey McCreath, Cynthia McDonald, Laura McFarlan, Elizabeth McGivney, Grace McKay, Katiana McNish-Crut, Marlene Melo, Nathalie Mendes, Diane Mendicino, Vilma Mendoza, Anthony Midgett, Jose Molina, Coleen Montague, Danyelle Moore, Durell Morris, Roberto Mortimer, Philomena Mulzac, Aja Murray, Jeremiah Nalls, Tracy Neale, Dwayne Nealy, Sheryl Nedd, Natacha Nelson, Belisa Nieves, Bridget Nwogu, Carlotta Ofield, Harvey Ogun, Donette Olivier, Kolawole Omoladune, Melissa Ortiz, Florence Otasowie, Bosede Otulaja, Tracy Oxilas, Erica Pagan, Derrick Pascall, Jenevie Pascall, John Patrissi, Anika Peaster, Janice Pemberton, Diana Perez, Gillian Perez, Noelia Perez, Tanya Perry, Jerma Peter, Monica Pinto, Aron Piron, Erica Pitts, Carmen Polanco, Justyna Poltorak, Theresa Price, Jessica Prudencio, Danna Purnell, Deidre Queeley, Katherine Quiles, Sheila Ralling, Iydes Ramirez, Leslie Ramsay, Shreshtha Ramsumair, Latisha Reed, Sharon Reed, Hilary Reid, Shakima Renee, Marie Renelus-Wray, Evett Ricketts, Lesceene Ricketts, Racquel Ritch, Adeleen Rivera, Angelique Rivera, Celeste Rivera, Jasmine Rivera, Audrey Rivers, Jessica Roa, Clarice Robinson, Na'eema Robinson, Stacey Robinson, Lisa Rodriguez, Sandra Rodriguez, Surayya Rogers, Gizelle Roland, Alexis Rosado, Qiana Ross-Figueroa, Gene-Clairie Saint-Ulysse, Latisha Samuels, Mariela Sanchez, Stacey Sandoval, Edward Santos, Francesca Saraniero, Lawrence Sari, Solangel Saunders, Monifa Scafe, Sharice Scott, Conrad Seivwright, Syndia Semexant, Linda Seppy, Kadisha Serrano, Jo Ann Sexton, Shamika Shaheed, Ceceila Sheppard, Louise Sherlock, Kechipetronilla Simon-Ebughu, Jacqueline Williams, Zenie Singleton, Yalya Sirotin, Marsha Skeen, Marie Skyers, Chebby Smith, Leslie Smith, Nikia Smith, Azzurdee Southerland, Avery Spearman, Flore St. Aime, Daphne St. Valliere, Melissa Stagg, Judine Steele, ShaQuanna Sterling, Analida Stewart, Shirleen Stewart, Ailsa Stiell, Richard Stockner, Tenneshia Streete, Nichole Stuart, Darrell Subryan, Robert Suozzo, Alexie Talbott, Marie Taluy, Caridad Taylor, Honora Thompson, Vanessa Thompson, Theresa Thomson, Wanda Tolliver, Tiffany Toussaint, Caryl Trocard, Mark Turner, Iasia Tyre, Aja Undly, Demarie Urdaz, Jessy Vargas, Ivis Vasquez, Keisha Vaughan, Seannette Vaughan, Melanie Velez, Shelley Ann Walker, Suhaiylah Warner, Abigail Watkins, Everett Wattley, Donna West, Bernadette Whaley, Marianne Whitfield, Chet Williams, Desterneen Williams, Edwige Williams, Marc Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jadai Wilson, Judith Wilson, Sandra Wofford, Germaine Woods, Sherri Wright, Shakia Yelder-Pearson, Jeffrey Yuille. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pordy, Hope)
November 21, 2016 Filing 14 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Modupe Abdul, Khadiya Abdul-Mayid, Davida Adams, Kehinde Adebo, Alaba Adelaja, Jonathan Aguilera, Dora Akhazeta, Akintunji Akinyemi, Jamie Albert, Sherley Albert, Rina Alcantara, Amanda Alexander, Melinda Algarin, Francine Allman, Adela Alvarez, Melanie Alves, Caroline Amaobi, Ayanna Ambris, Natocha Anfant, Edward Appiah-Gyasi, Arlene Archer-Lewis, LaShawn Aris, Andrea Avent, Florence Awotoye, Lorna Bailey, Fritz Balan, Sherisse Baptiste, Tamara Battle, Bolade Begho, Sharon Belizairo, Juanita Bell, Valerie Bell, Cesarina Bello, Melly Bello, Muhammad Bello, Valerie Belton, Albert-Ann Benjamin, Janelle Benjamin, Sheila Bennett, Peter Bentevis, Jannie Benton-Reddick, Suhura Bernard, Theophilus Bey, Trisha Blair, Sybil Blaize-Smith, Alphonso Blake, Eula Blake, Elianny Bonilla-Arzu, Wesley Boone, Jennifer Bordes, Adrienne Bostic-Cush, Michael Bowens, Cheryl Bowman, Dorinda Braxton, Yvette Brickhouse, Jacqueline Brissett, Monique Bristol, Chevelle Brown, Donna Brown, Karlene Brown, Lorna Brown, Shanequa Brown, Melissa Browne, Patsy Bruton, Amenda Bunch, Karla Caceres, Anthony Caguioa, Jill Campbell, Suzette Campbell, Tyesha Capers, Uhura Carter, Leroy Carty, Myriam Castro, Ralene Caton, Dorothy Cervero, Lorna Chambers, Edoll Chance-Bullen, Jultilde Charles, Miralle Charles, Sharon Charles, Michael Chasan, Cameo Christian, Shaquanna Clark, June Clarke, Neville Clayton, Jennifer Cobrand, Shaquana Cole, Candace Coleman, Jacqueline Coleman, Kedra Collins, Betzaida Colon, Stella Combet, Danielle Cook, Kristi Cook, Yvonne Cooper, Greta Cornwall, Kim Crocker, Betty Cruz, Angus Cuffy, Kristal Daniels, La-Starr Davis, Michael Davis, Sasha Dawson, Catiana Day, Kenson DeBique, Maricelis DeJesus, Mayra DePena, Tyeisha Deas, Dwight Delmhorst, Andrea Derrell, Michelle Diaz, Daria Dietz, Lois Dobbs-Rose, Monique Dorsett, Crystal Dorsey, Tamara Douglas-Juba, Alice Duarte, Tahisia Duckett, Shavarra Dudley-Ruffin, Shantae Dukes, Felix Dumay, Tammy Dumay, Patricia Duncan, Anne-Marie Edreira, Daria Edwards, Monique Edwards, Yulonde Edwards, Frenel Elysee, Heather Emmanuel, Crystal Espaillat, Ivette Espinoza, Ishmael Essiem, Jordan Evans, Nina Evans, Shareem Evans, Angelberth Ezeogu, Ritza Falcon-Santiago, Marina Falconi, Barbara Famosa, Antoine Farrar, Charmain Farrar, Jenai Faulk, Maria Felix, Valerie Ferguson, Adrianne Fernandez, Carlos Fernandez, Vivian Finney, Corinda Fleming, Mtonya Fletcher, Ronnie Ford, Almaz Forsythe, Daina Foster, Cecily Francis, Cynthia Franco, Sharon Frank, Robin Galloway, Tiffany Garland, LaShawn Garner, Nyra Garner, Cassandra Gary, Kirsten George, Cheryl Gilchrest-Ray, Alicia Gilkes, Mary Glynn, Patrice Goburn, Sharon Goldberg, Henry Gomez, Marina Gomez, Lori Gooden, Sheldeane Gooding, Nichole Goodridge, Lauren Goodwin, Haydee Gorris, Kareen Goss, Samantha Grant, Sara Graves, Dorothea Gray, Aneisha Green, Margaret Green, Myrtle Green, LaToya Greene, Nisaa Greenley, Malika Gresham, Khalilah Griffiths, Derricka Gritten, Donald Guercin, Maria Guzman, Basil Hall, Quran Hall, Kalellia Hamilton, Lesa Hamilton, Jessica Hance, Vanessa Harris, Ishakeya Hayden, Rachel Haynes, Shemroy Haynes, Joy Headley, Albania Henry, Evelyn Herrera, Judith Herrera, Lillian Hicks, Jazman Hill, Cherie Hinds, Nakiema Hodges, Isolene Holder, Lisa Holmes, Marcia Holness, Melissa Hough, Brenda Howard-Boyce, Candis Hoyte-Williams, Renee Hull, Felisa Hurst, Lakkiyah Hutchinson, Lydia Hyatt, Anne Idowu, Boniface Ikemenoagu, Georgia Inegbenebo, Kawan Inman, Jeannette Jack, Tiffany Jack, Rachelle Jackson, Tywana Jackson, Jennifer James, Tawana Jean-Baptiste, Valerie Jean-Henry, Aprila Johnson, Genine Johnson, Janice Johnson, Michelle Johnson, Phyllis Johnson, Rose Johnson, Tamara Johnson, Alysia Jones, Michael Jones, Yolanda Jones, Josianne Joseph-Mothersil, Januarie Joubert, Danielle Jurkuwicz, Brian Kehoe, Asha Kenion, Frieda King, Shelly Kirshenbaum, Jenine Kishun, Massiel Knight, Shawn Knight, Daniel Knuckles, Jennifer Koppelman, Linda Lampone, Sonya Leach, Krashawn Lee, Jessica Leibel, Lidia Leon, Dottia Lewis, Najah Lewis, Mavernie Lilly, Gedline Lincifort, Lynetta Lipsey-Hughes, Twana Little, Brittin Loewy, Shanelle Long, Jiselle Lorde, Natarsky Louissaint, Marilyn Lovell, Davina Maddux, Avinash Maharaj, Helene Marcel, Zena Marks, Gisselle Marte, Nichola Martin, Tiffane Martin-Lucas, Keisha Martinez, Patricia Martucci, Sharon Maxwell, Brenda Mayo, Ila McCall, Chervon McClelland, William McComb, Tracey McCreath, Cynthia McDonald, Laura McFarlan, Elizabeth McGivney, Grace McKay, Katiana McNish-Crut, Marlene Melo, Nathalie Mendes, Diane Mendicino, Vilma Mendoza, Anthony Midgett, Jose Molina, Coleen Montague, Danyelle Moore, Durell Morris, Roberto Mortimer, Philomena Mulzac, Aja Murray, Jeremiah Nalls, Tracy Neale, Dwayne Nealy, Sheryl Nedd, Natacha Nelson, Belisa Nieves, Hilary Reid, Jacqueline Williams, Bridget Nwogu, Carlotta Ofield, Harvey Ogun, Donette Olivier, Kolawole Omoladune, Melissa Ortiz, Florence Otasowie, Bosede Otulaja, Tracy Oxilas, Erica Pagan, Derrick Pascall, Jenevie Pascall, John Patrissi, Anika Peaster, Janice Pemberton, Diana Perez, Gillian Perez, Noelia Perez, Tanya Perry, Jerma Peter, Monica Pinto, Aron Piron, Erica Pitts, Carmen Polanco, Justyna Poltorak, Theresa Price, Jessica Prudencio, Danna Purnell, Deidre Queeley, Katherine Quiles, Sheila Ralling, Iydes Ramirez, Leslie Ramsay, Shreshtha Ramsumair, Latisha Reed, Sharon Reed, Shakima Renee, Marie Renelus-Wray, Evett Ricketts, Lesceene Ricketts, Racquel Ritch, Adeleen Rivera, Angelique Rivera, Celeste Rivera, Jasmine Rivera, Audrey Rivers, Jessica Roa, Clarice Robinson, Na'eema Robinson, Stacey Robinson, Lisa Rodriguez, Sandra Rodriguez, Surayya Rogers, Gizelle Roland, Alexis Rosado, Qiana Ross-Figueroa, Gene-Clairie Saint-Ulysse, Latisha Samuels, Mariela Sanchez, Stacey Sandoval, Edward Santos, Francesca Saraniero, Lawrence Sari, Solangel Saunders, Monifa Scafe, Sharice Scott, Conrad Seivwright, Syndia Semexant, Linda Seppy, Kadisha Serrano, Jo Ann Sexton, Shamika Shaheed, Ceceila Sheppard, Louise Sherlock, Kechipetronilla Simon-Ebughu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pordy, Hope)
November 21, 2016 Filing 13 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Modupe Abdul, Khadiya Abdul-Mayid, Davida Adams, Kehinde Adebo, Alaba Adelaja, Jonathan Aguilera, Dora Akhazeta, Akintunji Akinyemi, Jamie Albert, Sherley Albert, Rina Alcantara, Amanda Alexander, Melinda Algarin, Francine Allman, Adela Alvarez, Melanie Alves, Caroline Amaobi, Ayanna Ambris, Natocha Anfant, Edward Appiah-Gyasi, Arlene Archer-Lewis, LaShawn Aris, Andrea Avent, Florence Awotoye, Lorna Bailey, Fritz Balan, Sherisse Baptiste, Tamara Battle, Bolade Begho, Sharon Belizairo, Juanita Bell, Valerie Bell, Cesarina Bello, Melly Bello, Muhammad Bello, Valerie Belton, Albert-Ann Benjamin, Janelle Benjamin, Sheila Bennett, Peter Bentevis, Jannie Benton-Reddick, Suhura Bernard, Theophilus Bey, Trisha Blair, Sybil Blaize-Smith, Alphonso Blake, Eula Blake, Elianny Bonilla-Arzu, Wesley Boone, Jennifer Bordes, Adrienne Bostic-Cush, Michael Bowens, Cheryl Bowman, Dorinda Braxton, Yvette Brickhouse, Jacqueline Brissett, Monique Bristol, Chevelle Brown, Donna Brown, Karlene Brown, Lorna Brown, Shanequa Brown, Melissa Browne, Patsy Bruton, Amenda Bunch, Karla Caceres, Anthony Caguioa, Jill Campbell, Suzette Campbell, Tyesha Capers, Uhura Carter, Leroy Carty, Myriam Castro, Ralene Caton, Dorothy Cervero, Lorna Chambers, Edoll Chance-Bullen, Jultilde Charles, Miralle Charles, Sharon Charles, Michael Chasan, Cameo Christian, Shaquanna Clark, June Clarke, Neville Clayton, Jennifer Cobrand, Shaquana Cole, Candace Coleman, Jacqueline Coleman, Kedra Collins, Betzaida Colon, Stella Combet, Danielle Cook, Kristi Cook, Yvonne Cooper, Greta Cornwall, Kim Crocker, Betty Cruz, Angus Cuffy, Kristal Daniels, La-Starr Davis, Michael Davis, Sasha Dawson, Catiana Day, Kenson DeBique, Maricelis DeJesus, Mayra DePena, Tyeisha Deas, Dwight Delmhorst, Andrea Derrell, Michelle Diaz, Daria Dietz, Lois Dobbs-Rose, Monique Dorsett, Crystal Dorsey, Tamara Douglas-Juba, Alice Duarte, Tahisia Duckett, Shavarra Dudley-Ruffin, Shantae Dukes, Felix Dumay, Tammy Dumay, Patricia Duncan, Anne-Marie Edreira, Daria Edwards, Monique Edwards, Yulonde Edwards, Frenel Elysee, Heather Emmanuel, Crystal Espaillat, Ivette Espinoza, Ishmael Essiem, Jordan Evans, Nina Evans, Shareem Evans, Angelberth Ezeogu, Ritza Falcon-Santiago, Marina Falconi, Barbara Famosa, Antoine Farrar, Charmain Farrar, Jenai Faulk, Maria Felix, Valerie Ferguson, Adrianne Fernandez, Carlos Fernandez, Vivian Finney, Corinda Fleming, Mtonya Fletcher, Ronnie Ford, Almaz Forsythe, Daina Foster, Cecily Francis, Cynthia Franco, Sharon Frank, Robin Galloway, Tiffany Garland, LaShawn Garner, Nyra Garner, Cassandra Gary, Kirsten George, Cheryl Gilchrest-Ray, Alicia Gilkes, Mary Glynn, Patrice Goburn, Sharon Goldberg, Henry Gomez, Marina Gomez, Lori Gooden, Sheldeane Gooding, Nichole Goodridge, Lauren Goodwin, Haydee Gorris, Kareen Goss, Samantha Grant, Sara Graves, Dorothea Gray, Aneisha Green, Margaret Green, Myrtle Green, LaToya Greene, Nisaa Greenley, Malika Gresham, Khalilah Griffiths, Derricka Gritten, Donald Guercin, Maria Guzman, Basil Hall, Quran Hall, Kalellia Hamilton, Lesa Hamilton, Jessica Hance, Vanessa Harris, Ishakeya Hayden, Rachel Haynes, Shemroy Haynes, Joy Headley, Albania Henry, Evelyn Herrera, Judith Herrera, Lillian Hicks, Jazman Hill, Cherie Hinds, Nakiema Hodges, Isolene Holder, Lisa Holmes, Marcia Holness, Melissa Hough, Brenda Howard-Boyce, Candis Hoyte-Williams, Renee Hull, Felisa Hurst, Lakkiyah Hutchinson, Lydia Hyatt, Anne Idowu, Boniface Ikemenoagu, Georgia Inegbenebo, Kawan Inman, Jeannette Jack, Tiffany Jack, Rachelle Jackson, Tywana Jackson, Jennifer James, Tawana Jean-Baptiste, Valerie Jean-Henry, Aprila Johnson, Shelly Kirshenbaum, Hilary Reid, Jacqueline Williams, Genine Johnson, Janice Johnson, Michelle Johnson, Phyllis Johnson, Rose Johnson, Tamara Johnson, Alysia Jones, Michael Jones, Yolanda Jones, Josianne Joseph-Mothersil, Januarie Joubert, Danielle Jurkuwicz, Brian Kehoe, Asha Kenion, Frieda King, Jenine Kishun, Massiel Knight, Shawn Knight, Daniel Knuckles, Jennifer Koppelman, Linda Lampone, Sonya Leach, Krashawn Lee, Jessica Leibel, Lidia Leon, Dottia Lewis, Najah Lewis, Mavernie Lilly, Gedline Lincifort, Lynetta Lipsey-Hughes, Twana Little, Brittin Loewy, Shanelle Long, Jiselle Lorde, Natarsky Louissaint, Marilyn Lovell, Davina Maddux, Avinash Maharaj, Helene Marcel, Zena Marks, Gisselle Marte, Nichola Martin, Keisha Martinez, Tiffane Martin-Lucas, Patricia Martucci, Sharon Maxwell, Brenda Mayo, Ila McCall, Chervon McClelland, William McComb, Tracey McCreath, Cynthia McDonald, Laura McFarlan, Elizabeth McGivney, Grace McKay, Katiana McNish-Crut, Marlene Melo, Nathalie Mendes, Diane Mendicino, Vilma Mendoza, Anthony Midgett, Jose Molina, Coleen Montague, Danyelle Moore, Durell Morris, Roberto Mortimer, Philomena Mulzac, Aja Murray, Jeremiah Nalls, Tracy Neale, Dwayne Nealy, Sheryl Nedd, Natacha Nelson, Belisa Nieves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pordy, Hope)
November 21, 2016 Filing 12 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Modupe Abdul, Khadiya Abdul-Mayid, Davida Adams, Kehinde Adebo, Alaba Adelaja, Jonathan Aguilera, Dora Akhazeta, Akintunji Akinyemi, Jamie Albert, Sherley Albert, Rina Alcantara, Amanda Alexander, Melinda Algarin, Francine Allman, Adela Alvarez, Melanie Alves, Caroline Amaobi, Ayanna Ambris, Natocha Anfant, Edward Appiah-Gyasi, Arlene Archer-Lewis, LaShawn Aris, Andrea Avent, Florence Awotoye, Lorna Bailey, Fritz Balan, Sherisse Baptiste, Tamara Battle, Bolade Begho, Sharon Belizairo, Juanita Bell, Valerie Bell, Cesarina Bello, Melly Bello, Muhammad Bello, Valerie Belton, Albert-Ann Benjamin, Janelle Benjamin, Sheila Bennett, Peter Bentevis, Jannie Benton-Reddick, Suhura Bernard, Theophilus Bey, Trisha Blair, Sybil Blaize-Smith, Alphonso Blake, Eula Blake, Elianny Bonilla-Arzu, Wesley Boone, Jennifer Bordes, Adrienne Bostic-Cush, Michael Bowens, Cheryl Bowman, Dorinda Braxton, Yvette Brickhouse, Jacqueline Brissett, Monique Bristol, Chevelle Brown, Donna Brown, Karlene Brown, Lorna Brown, Shanequa Brown, Melissa Browne, Patsy Bruton, Amenda Bunch, Karla Caceres, Anthony Caguioa, Jill Campbell, Suzette Campbell, Tyesha Capers, Uhura Carter, Leroy Carty, Myriam Castro, Ralene Caton, Dorothy Cervero, Lorna Chambers, Edoll Chance-Bullen, Jultilde Charles, Miralle Charles, Sharon Charles, Michael Chasan, Cameo Christian, Shaquanna Clark, June Clarke, Neville Clayton, Jennifer Cobrand, Shaquana Cole, Candace Coleman, Jacqueline Coleman, Kedra Collins, Betzaida Colon, Stella Combet, Danielle Cook, Kristi Cook, Yvonne Cooper, Greta Cornwall, Kim Crocker, Betty Cruz, Angus Cuffy, Kristal Daniels, La-Starr Davis, Michael Davis, Sasha Dawson, Catiana Day, Kenson DeBique, Maricelis DeJesus, Mayra DePena, Tyeisha Deas, Dwight Delmhorst, Andrea Derrell, Michelle Diaz, Daria Dietz, Lois Dobbs-Rose, Monique Dorsett, Crystal Dorsey, Tamara Douglas-Juba, Alice Duarte, Tahisia Duckett, Shavarra Dudley-Ruffin, Shantae Dukes, Felix Dumay, Tammy Dumay, Patricia Duncan, Anne-Marie Edreira, Daria Edwards, Monique Edwards, Yulonde Edwards, Frenel Elysee, Heather Emmanuel, Crystal Espaillat, Ivette Espinoza, Ishmael Essiem, Jordan Evans, Nina Evans, Shareem Evans, Angelberth Ezeogu, Ritza Falcon-Santiago, Marina Falconi, Barbara Famosa, Antoine Farrar, Charmain Farrar, Jenai Faulk, Maria Felix, Valerie Ferguson, Adrianne Fernandez, Carlos Fernandez, Vivian Finney, Corinda Fleming, Mtonya Fletcher, Ronnie Ford, Almaz Forsythe, Shelly Kirshenbaum, Hilary Reid, Jacqueline Williams, Daina Foster, Cecily Francis, Cynthia Franco, Sharon Frank, Robin Galloway, Tiffany Garland, LaShawn Garner, Nyra Garner, Cassandra Gary, Kirsten George, Cheryl Gilchrest-Ray, Alicia Gilkes, Mary Glynn, Patrice Goburn, Sharon Goldberg, Henry Gomez, Marina Gomez, Lori Gooden, Sheldeane Gooding, Nichole Goodridge, Lauren Goodwin, Haydee Gorris, Kareen Goss, Samantha Grant, Sara Graves, Dorothea Gray, Aneisha Green, Margaret Green, Myrtle Green, LaToya Greene, Nisaa Greenley, Malika Gresham, Khalilah Griffiths, Derricka Gritten, Donald Guercin, Maria Guzman, Basil Hall, Quran Hall, Kalellia Hamilton, Lesa Hamilton, Jessica Hance, Vanessa Harris, Ishakeya Hayden, Rachel Haynes, Shemroy Haynes, Joy Headley, Albania Henry, Evelyn Herrera, Judith Herrera, Lillian Hicks, Jazman Hill, Cherie Hinds, Nakiema Hodges, Isolene Holder, Lisa Holmes, Marcia Holness, Melissa Hough, Brenda Howard-Boyce, Candis Hoyte-Williams, Renee Hull, Felisa Hurst, Lakkiyah Hutchinson, Lydia Hyatt, Anne Idowu, Boniface Ikemenoagu, Georgia Inegbenebo, Kawan Inman, Jeannette Jack, Tiffany Jack, Rachelle Jackson, Tywana Jackson, Jennifer James, Tawana Jean-Baptiste, Valerie Jean-Henry, Aprila Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pordy, Hope)
November 21, 2016 Filing 11 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Modupe Abdul, Khadiya Abdul-Mayid, Davida Adams, Kehinde Adebo, Alaba Adelaja, Jonathan Aguilera, Dora Akhazeta, Akintunji Akinyemi, Jamie Albert, Sherley Albert, Rina Alcantara, Amanda Alexander, Melinda Algarin, Francine Allman, Adela Alvarez, Melanie Alves, Caroline Amaobi, Ayanna Ambris, Natocha Anfant, Edward Appiah-Gyasi, Arlene Archer-Lewis, LaShawn Aris, Andrea Avent, Florence Awotoye, Lorna Bailey, Fritz Balan, Sherisse Baptiste, Tamara Battle, Bolade Begho, Sharon Belizairo, Juanita Bell, Valerie Bell, Cesarina Bello, Melly Bello, Muhammad Bello, Valerie Belton, Albert-Ann Benjamin, Janelle Benjamin, Sheila Bennett, Peter Bentevis, Jannie Benton-Reddick, Suhura Bernard, Theophilus Bey, Trisha Blair, Sybil Blaize-Smith, Alphonso Blake, Eula Blake, Elianny Bonilla-Arzu, Wesley Boone, Jennifer Bordes, Adrienne Bostic-Cush, Michael Bowens, Cheryl Bowman, Dorinda Braxton, Yvette Brickhouse, Jacqueline Brissett, Monique Bristol, Chevelle Brown, Donna Brown, Karlene Brown, Lorna Brown, Shanequa Brown, Melissa Browne, Patsy Bruton, Amenda Bunch, Karla Caceres, Anthony Caguioa, Jill Campbell, Suzette Campbell, Tyesha Capers, Uhura Carter, Leroy Carty, Myriam Castro, Ralene Caton, Dorothy Cervero, Lorna Chambers, Shelly Kirshenbaum, Hilary Reid, Jacqueline Williams, Edoll Chance-Bullen, Jultilde Charles, Miralle Charles, Sharon Charles, Michael Chasan, Cameo Christian, Shaquanna Clark, June Clarke, Neville Clayton, Jennifer Cobrand, Shaquana Cole, Candace Coleman, Jacqueline Coleman, Kedra Collins, Betzaida Colon, Stella Combet, Danielle Cook, Kristi Cook, Yvonne Cooper, Greta Cornwall, Kim Crocker, Betty Cruz, Angus Cuffy, Kristal Daniels, La-Starr Davis, Michael Davis, Sasha Dawson, Catiana Day, Tyeisha Deas, Kenson DeBique, Maricelis DeJesus, Dwight Delmhorst, Mayra DePena, Andrea Derrell, Michelle Diaz, Daria Dietz, Lois Dobbs-Rose, Monique Dorsett, Crystal Dorsey, Tamara Douglas-Juba, Alice Duarte, Tahisia Duckett, Shavarra Dudley-Ruffin, Shantae Dukes, Felix Dumay, Tammy Dumay, Patricia Duncan, Anne-Marie Edreira, Daria Edwards, Monique Edwards, Yulonde Edwards, Frenel Elysee, Heather Emmanuel, Crystal Espaillat, Ivette Espinoza, Ishmael Essiem, Jordan Evans, Nina Evans, Shareem Evans, Angelberth Ezeogu, Marina Falconi, Ritza Falcon-Santiago, Barbara Famosa, Antoine Farrar, Charmain Farrar, Jenai Faulk, Maria Felix, Valerie Ferguson, Adrianne Fernandez, Carlos Fernandez, Vivian Finney, Corinda Fleming, Mtonya Fletcher, Ronnie Ford, Almaz Forsythe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pordy, Hope)
November 21, 2016 Filing 10 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Sherisse Baptiste, Shelly Kirshenbaum, Hilary Reid, Jacqueline Williams, Modupe Abdul, Khadiya Abdul-Mayid, Davida Adams, Kehinde Adebo, Alaba Adelaja, Jonathan Aguilera, Dora Akhazeta, Akintunji Akinyemi, Jamie Albert, Sherley Albert, Rina Alcantara, Amanda Alexander, Melinda Algarin, Francine Allman, Adela Alvarez, Melanie Alves, Caroline Amaobi, Ayanna Ambris, Natocha Anfant, Edward Appiah-Gyasi, Arlene Archer-Lewis, LaShawn Aris, Andrea Avent, Florence Awotoye, Lorna Bailey, Fritz Balan, Tamara Battle, Bolade Begho, Sharon Belizairo, Juanita Bell, Valerie Bell, Cesarina Bello, Melly Bello, Muhammad Bello, Valerie Belton, Albert-Ann Benjamin, Janelle Benjamin, Sheila Bennett, Peter Bentevis, Jannie Benton-Reddick, Suhura Bernard, Theophilus Bey, Trisha Blair, Sybil Blaize-Smith, Alphonso Blake, Eula Blake, Elianny Bonilla-Arzu, Wesley Boone, Jennifer Bordes, Adrienne Bostic-Cush, Michael Bowens, Cheryl Bowman, Dorinda Braxton, Yvette Brickhouse, Jacqueline Brissett, Monique Bristol, Chevelle Brown, Donna Brown, Karlene Brown, Lorna Brown, Shanequa Brown, Melissa Browne, Patsy Bruton, Amenda Bunch, Karla Caceres, Anthony Caguioa, Jill Campbell, Suzette Campbell, Tyesha Capers, Uhura Carter, Leroy Carty, Myriam Castro, Ralene Caton, Dorothy Cervero, Lorna Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pordy, Hope)
November 9, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hope Allison Pordy on behalf of Sherisse Baptiste, Shelly Kirshenbaum, Hilary Reid, Jacqueline Williams. (Pordy, Hope)
November 9, 2016 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:14-cv-4142 (PGG). Document filed by Sherisse Baptiste, Shelly Kirshenbaum, Hilary Reid, Jacqueline Williams.(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 9, 2016 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York. (rch)
November 9, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gregory Keith McGillivary. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 29:201; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:207; the County code has been modified to Kings; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (rch)
November 9, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Diana Nobile to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12962966. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #3 MOTION for Gregory K. McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12962937. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 9, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Gregory Keith McGillivary to RE-FILE Related Case Statement attached to Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the related case statement. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (rch)
November 9, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gregory Keith McGillivary. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sherisse Baptiste, City of New York, Shelly Kirshenbaum, Hilary Reid, Jacqueline Williams. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (rch)
November 9, 2016 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (rch)
November 9, 2016 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul G. Gardephe as possibly related to 14-cv-4142. (rch)
November 9, 2016 Case Designated ECF. (rch)
November 8, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Michelle Block on behalf of Sherisse Baptiste, Shelly Kirshenbaum, Hilary Reid, Jacqueline Williams. (Block, Sarah)
November 8, 2016 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sherisse Baptiste, Shelly Kirshenbaum, Hilary Reid, Jacqueline Williams. (McGillivary, Gregory)
November 8, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION for Diana Nobile to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12962966. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sherisse Baptiste, Shelly Kirshenbaum, Hilary Reid, Jacqueline Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 8, 2016 Filing 3 MOTION for Gregory K. McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12962937. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sherisse Baptiste, Shelly Kirshenbaum, Hilary Reid, Jacqueline Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 8, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Related Case Statement)(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 8, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12962923)Document filed by Jacqueline Williams, Hilary Reid, Shelly Kirshenbaum, Sherisse Baptiste. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Consent to Join)(McGillivary, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Ferguson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Taluy
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Whitfield
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Franco
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natarsky Louissaint
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison Matthew
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Grant
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quran Hall
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Algarin
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Rodriguez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felisa Hurst
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malika Gresham
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Jones
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mtonya Fletcher
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorna Chambers
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bosede Otulaja
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ailsa Stiell
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ishmael Essiem
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwige Williams
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Dobbs-Rose
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorna Bailey
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheldeane Gooding
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Prudencio
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Brickhouse
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Oxilas
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Racquel Ritch
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fritz Balan
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uhura Carter
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Charles
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralene Caton
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesarina Bello
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sybil Blaize-Smith
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Falconi
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noelia Perez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Glynn
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suhaiylah Warner
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Robert Blake
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kehinde Adebo
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorna Brown
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Amaobi
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zackary M Logan
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrianne Fernandez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence Awotoye
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthurene Baugh
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Headley
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akunna Chizoma Osuagwu
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Leibel
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sasha Dawson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Patrissi
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Green
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McComb
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hance
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shakima Renee
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Santos
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derricka Gritten
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Wilkins
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Coleman
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zena Marks
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shavarra Dudley-Ruffin
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caryl Trocard
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmaine McDonald
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Appiah-Gyasi
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Barton
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Cruz
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Skyers
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannette Jack
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Herrera
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Jean-Henry
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theophilus Bey
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Flaverney
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenine Kishun
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chervon McClelland
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Yuille
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerma Peter
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Dorsey
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Turner
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Cook
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Crocker
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameo Christian
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Velez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherisse Baptiste
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Caguioa
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesa Hamilton
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Delmhorst
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Hull
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Hicks
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yulonde Edwards
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Quiles
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Bello
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Guzman
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shareem Evans
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Espaillat
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vilma Mendoza
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Hipp
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Molina
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latisha Samuels
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farhana Afroze
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Vega
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helene Marcel
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akintunji Akinyemi
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Chasan
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Douglas-Juba
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Gilchrest-Ray
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Renelus-Wray
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krashawn Lee
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Guercin
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Demadet
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idoline Genus
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittin Loewy
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qiana Ross-Figueroa
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Winslow
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarice Robinson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Derrell
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Bowman
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seannette Vaughan
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaneese Carlton
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honora Thompson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syndia Semexant
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daphne St. Valliere
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portia Woods
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Galloway
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Johnson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaShawn Aris
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shemroy Haynes
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenesha Turner
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donette Olivier
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenai Faulk
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Cook
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kolawole Omoladune
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alysia Jones
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirsten George
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Analida Stewart
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Gomez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corinda Fleming
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Combet
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Alexander
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Holness
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kawan Inman
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catiana Day
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia Leon
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Evans
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Almaz Forsythe
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Coleman
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angus Cuffy
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wynsome Slocombe
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nuvia Velasquez
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gisselle Marte
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikia Smith
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davina Maddux
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Famosa
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jultilde Charles
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Mortimer
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solangel Saunders
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Smith-James
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edoll Chance-Bullen
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jazman Hill
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aja Murray
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Duncan
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modupe Abdul
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azzurdee Southerland
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Shodolamu
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Jack
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Ford
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Wright
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareen Goss
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakkiyah Hutchinson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Graves
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexie Talbott
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miralle Charles
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Alejandro
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Clarke
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Gooden
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Pitts
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Perez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Lovell
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alphonso Blake
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philomena Mulzac
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Rivera
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ShaQuanna Sterling
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greta Cornwall
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Ortiz
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aneisha Green
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Gilkes
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayra DePena
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Knuckles
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shreshtha Ramsumair
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Felix
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davida Adams
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Ortiz
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Melo
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilary Reid
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffane Martin-Lucas
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Sandoval
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenevie Pascall
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kechipetronilla Simon-Ebughu
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Adolphe
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherisse Rogers
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Williams
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Diana J. Nobile
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deidre Queeley
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neville Clayton
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lampone
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frieda King
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isolene Holder
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toronda Hayes
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Bruton
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Smith
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Mendicino
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiselle Lorde
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Harris
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daria Dietz
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Brissett
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adel Benjamin
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mavernie Lilly
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Neale
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Januarie Joubert
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelberth Ezeogu
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherley Albert
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Rivers
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene-Clairie Saint-Ulysse
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Gary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suhura Bernard
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yannique-Gail Maria Coleman
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Lundi
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natocha Anfant
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorinda Braxton
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Pascall
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyeisha Deas
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Roa
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tenneshia Streete
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josianne Joseph-Mothersil
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melly Bello
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura McFarlan
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Douglas
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Emmanuel
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Albert
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole Stuart
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Rosado
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Ramos
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nyra Garner
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ritza Falcon-Santiago
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha Vaughan
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Stockner
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Carty
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawana Jean-Baptiste
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Johnson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristal Daniels
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Finney
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Hinds
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Seppy
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Perry
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ishakeya Hayden
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Robinson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Williams
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karlene Brown
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Idowu
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Ann Walker
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Bentevis
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Cobrand
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Goodwin
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latanya McCain
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Racquel McIntosh
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gillian Perez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessy Vargas
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Williams
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Alves
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Bennett
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shakia Yelder-Pearson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candis Hoyte-Williams
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Rivera
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Najah Lewis
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chevelle Brown
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jannie Benton-Reddick
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Pagan
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genine Johnson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Haynes
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Archer-Lewis
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance |