Aviles et al v. S&P Global, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Luis Ramiro Aviles, Gullermo Benelli, Alejandro Berger, Hector Ruben Bircz, Ricardo Osvaldo Bluthgen, Jose Maria Cabrera, Gustavo Canil, Hugo Leonardo Carlini, Pablo Codevilla, Matias Luis Coll, Maria Teresa Del Carmen Correa Avila, Moises Luis Cotler, Marcello Luis De Leo, Diego Di Maggio, Jorge Daniel Diz, Silvio Roberto Donato, Cristian Horacio Ernst, Carlos Adrian Ferreti, Jorge Alberto Forlano, Fundacion Fiorenzo, Jose Antonio Garcia, Sebastian Gil Gilgarro, Luis Miguel Girardotti, Francisco Javier Gomez Ronco, Jose Antonio Gonzalez, Maria Elena Golzalez, Fernando E Granda, Manuel Herrera, Tomas Victoriano Herrero, Monica Huisman, Ana Maria Krieger, KP Ventures S.A., Graciela Stella Maris Magliano, Maria Beatriz Marquinez, Alberto Martinez, Fernando Matarazzo, Rafael Mendoza de la Torre, Mariano Jorge Miranda, Martin Miranda, Carlos Gabriel Miyagi, Silvana Montefiore, Jose Luis Patrignani, Enrique Horacio Picado, Lucilla Elena Paillard Polero, Pablo Gabriel Potokski, Victor Roberto Poggi, Prenton Industry Ltd, Ricardo Pujals, Diego Luis Rios, Norberto Vicente Rodriguez, Pablo Rodriguez Falcon, Gonzalo Sanchez Pupullo, Graciela Silva Siguenza, Marcelo Sugier, Hugo A Untersander, Ulan Bator Project Ltd, Christine A Verse, Juan Antonio Virag, Carlos Alberto Wehbi and Cesar R Zucchino
Defendant: S&P Global, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank NorthWest, N.A., Wells Fargo Delaware Trust Company, NA, ITM Twentyfirst LLC, Portsmouth Settlement Company I LLC and Roy G Smith
Case Number: 1:2017cv02987
Filed: April 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: J. Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES: A series of telephonic Case Management conferences in this matter are hereby scheduled for the following dates. The parties shall file a joint status letter that includes agenda items thr ee business days in advance of each conference. The letters shall be no more than five pages in length. Counsel is directed to call into the court conference line at the scheduled times. Please dial (866) 434-5269 Code: 4858267. Tuesday, J anuary 19, 2021 at 11:00 a.m.; Tuesday, March 02, 2021 at 10:00 a.m.; Tuesday, April 13, 2021 at 10:00 a.m.; Tuesday, May 11, 2021 at 10:00 a.m.; Tuesday, June 15, 2021 at 10:00 a.m.; Tuesday, July 13, 2021 at 10:00 a.m.; Tuesday, August 17, 2021 at 10:00 a.m.; Tuesday, September 14, 2021 at 10:00 a.m.; Tuesday, October 12, 2021 at 10:00 a.m.; Tuesday, November 16, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. ( Telephone Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Tele phone Conference set for 3/2/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Telephone Conference set for 4/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Telephone Conference set for 5/11/2021 at 10:00 AM before M agistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Telephone Conference set for 6/15/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Telephone Conference set for 7/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Telephone Confe rence set for 8/17/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Telephone Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Telephone Conference set for 10/12/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Telephone Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 10/26/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-02987-JPO-KHP, 1:17-cv-06087-JPO-KHP, 1:17-cv-07034-JPO-KHP, 1:18-cv-00128-JPO-KHP, 1:18-cv-02416-JPO-KHP (mro)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A telephonic settlement conference in this matter consisting of Plaintiffs, and the S&P Defendant is hereby scheduled for Monday, December 14, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel for the parties are di rected to call Judge Parker's court conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (866) 434-5269, Access code: 4858267. Counsel is directed to utilize the security passcode that was used at the previous conference on October 14, 20 20. ( Telephone Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 10/15/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-02987-JPO-KHP, 1:17-cv-06087-JPO-KHP, 1:17-cv-07034-JPO-KHP, 1:18-cv-00128-JPO-KHP, 1:18-cv-02416-JPO-KHP (mro)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A telephonic settlement conference in this matter consisting of Plaintiffs, and the Estate of Smith Defendant is hereby scheduled for Friday, November 13, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for the parties are directed to call Judge Parker's court conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (866) 434-5269, Access code: 4858267. Counsel is directed to utilize the security passcode that was used at the previous conference on October 14, 2020. ( Telephone Conference set for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 10/14/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-02987-JPO-KHP, 1:17-cv-06087-JPO-KHP, 1:17-cv-07034-JPO-KHP, 1:18-cv-00128-JPO-KHP, 1:18-cv-02416-JPO-KHP (mro)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A series of telephonic settlement conferences in this matter are scheduled as follows: Wednesday, October 14, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.: Plaintiffs and Defendants Marcum and the Estate of Smith; Wed nesday, October 14, 2020 at 2:00 p.m.: Plaintiffs and Defendant S&P; Thursday October 15, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.: Plaintiffs and the Wells Fargo Defendants; Thursday October 15, 2020 at 2:00 p.m.: Plaintiffs and the Equity Trust. Counsel for the parties are directed to call Judge Parker's court conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (866) 434-5269, Access code: 4858267. The Court will provide a unique passcode for each conference by email prior to the date of the conf erence; as further set forth herein. ( Telephone Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Telephone Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Telephone Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Telephone Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 8/24/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-02987-JPO-KHP, 1:17-cv-06087-JPO-KHP, 1:17-cv-07034-JPO-KHP, 1:18-cv-00128-JPO-KHP, 1:18-cv-02416-JPO-KHP (mro)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 266 OPINION AND ORDER: re: (97 in 1:17-cv-07034-JPO-KHP) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . filed by Wells Fargo Delaware Trust Company, Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc., (142 in 1:17-cv-06087-JPO-KHP) MOTION to Amend/Correct . filed by Nelida I. Vazquez, Blambus Group Inc., Maria Pia Saure, Ricardo Juan Garbarino, Maria Cristina Villanueva, Maria Beatriz Lopez Provera, Beatriz Julia Megy, Anna Maria Jorgelina Noguerol, Martin Arturo Carmona, Jorge Luis Germino, Ana Ester Giordani, Jose Rispau Vinas, Manual Atilio Iturralde, Antonio Emilio Pergomet, Diana Ana Maria Severin, Daniel Alberto Passaro, Fernando Raul Benedetto, Iject, Inc., Eduardo Maximo D el Torto, Plaza Asset Management Co., LTD, Graciela Cassutti, Maria Rita Lopez Provera, Francisco Miguel, (116 in 1:18-cv-00128-JPO-KHP) MOTION to Amend/Correct . filed by Diego Milberg, Carlos Alberto Mastronardi, Luis Angel Parent i, Dario Osmar Ascune, Marcelo Mario De Angelis, Silvia Del Rosal, Roxana Tagliaferro, Virginia Maria Ravenna, Juan Jose Etala, Miguel Angel Lecuna, Random Corp., Sabino Alvarez Salgueiro, Maximiliano Calp, Francisco Alberto Di Maio, Walter A . Tagliavini, Ricardo Simon Rodriguez, Martin Lizaso Bilbao, Tomas Ramon Zapata, Hugo Basilotta, Martin Rodrigo Pardo, Frederico Alvarez, Rodolfo Jorge Solis, Flint Consultant Ltd., Jorge Esteves, Patricia Boorman De Solari Loudet, Maria De La Caridad Gurnbaum, Fernando Lucas Luis Garcia Urrutia, Eva M.V. Berkes de Kolb, Marta Susana Cadario, Luis Tiphaine, Eduardo Pedro Martin, Maria Carmen Parise, Martin Furlong, Ida Alicia Sasso de Fernandez, Maria Balsano, Antonia Peyrani, Sa ndra Griselda Mendez, Bryant Line Corp., Jorge Lopez Nunez, Jose Ramon Rey, Nancy Carlota Bain, Graciela Villanueva, Edith Karina Volkmann, Miguel Angel Lopez, Jorge Enrique Gilardi, Juan Jose Comerio, Cristina Alicia Morrone, E-Sense Ltd., Elid a Alicia Taramasso, Roracio Rotta, Alejandra Maria Bossetti, Santos Oscar Sarnari, Daniel Esteban Martin, Jelifl Corp., Adriano Gino Venturi Aravena, Jorge Raccoursier Heisinger, Marcela Nora Tacchella, Sabino Javier Alvarez, Adriana Cappone, Da niel Nicolas Juansaras, Maximiliano Costa, Ana Maria Pereira, Alan Jose Horwitz, Gladys Leoni, Miguel Gregorio Podrzaj, Eva Friedman, Margarita Munoz Vargas, Roberto Mario Pugliese, Viviana Rut Minteguiaga, Beatriz Edith De La Torre, Jurge Luis Fernandez, Ana Maria Rogatti, Carlos Jorge Campioni, Maria Celina Pilato, David Fabian Huberman, Gustavo Cachiarelli, Pablo Fabian Gomez, Mystic Point Holding, Arnaldo Manuel Gomez, Maria Isabel Jankowski de Sym Smith, Ricardo Jose Hermida, Enri que Juan Carlos Paborell, Laura Beatriz Rosso Lastra, Claudia Isabel Morrone, Fabian Eduardo Angelilli, Alberto Ruben Santos, Selltas Trader Inc., Miriam Beatriz Fratini, Rafael Perez De La Fuente, Ana Orsola Moretti, Carlos Jose Benassi, Diego Es teban Chami, Nestor Perez Ponsa, Roberto Eduardo Wubbe, Ines Maria Iturraldo, Delia Haydee Schiappapietra, Osvaldo J. Barrionuevo, Lucas Gustavo De Feo, Amanda Ana Zocchi, Foxtom Assets Inc., CBM Agente de Valores S.A.,, Rut Veronica Ladanyi, Alfonso Eduardo Espino Paz, Miguel A. Morello, Alfredo M. De Baisio, Carlos Armando Donino, Juan Gregorio Navarro Floria, Antonio Ivan Podrzaj, Fernando Juan Fernandez, Elena Pedotti, Daniel Gustavo Tedesco, Ruth Naomi Ladner, Edgardo Luis Spina, M iguel Angel Cirio, Norma Beatriz Cianciarulo, Basic Fly Ltd., Marcelo Carlos Nacucchio, Mario Rafael De Dona, Daniel Enrique De Cabo, Hugo Baquerin, Erika Bienek, Haydee Noemi Tacta de Rodino, Dora N. Escribano, Ramon Tuma, Raul Oscar Ferrari, Graciela Roldan Perez, Enrique Alberto Fuertes, Mario Alberto Yampolsky, Micaela Puig, Aldo Bertolozzi, Juan Carlos Guaita, Maria Clotilde Josefi Lami Hernandez, Jose Alberto Picado, Claudio Daniel Husain, Alejo Gonzalez Garano, Flowyard Over seas Ltd., Mario Oscar Varela Ortiz, Mirta Garcia De La Fuente, Enrique Pedro Coscia, Kim Dai San, Joaquin Martinez Tenreiro, Hugo Benjamin Nicolli, Claudio Javier Glazman, Daniel Rodolfo Lugo, Diego H. Pulgar, (112 in 1:18-cv-02416-JPO-KHP) MO TION to Amend/Correct . filed by Osvaldo H. Scandola, Alicia S. Negreira, Monica Patricia Morena, Maria Cristina Fabricant, Torcuato Luis Battaglia, Martina Galli, Veronica Balbiani, Maria Candela D'Angelo, Nicolas Eduardo Bowen, York Venture Capital, Carlos Alfredo Grimaldi, Southern Services Company Corp., Luis Maria Games, Jorge Carlos Macellaro, Claudio Bruno Bartoli, Milda Beatriz Maseras, San Goal, Cecilia Inchausti, Jorge Norberto Garcia Cozzi, Maria Laura Trav ella, Daniel Floreal Fognini, Adriana Mabel Nieto, Maria Teresa Borrell Fortuny, Gonzalo Blaquier, Paz Veronica Chartier Campagne, Diego Grimaldi, Sonia Maricel Baravalle, Hector Jorge Areco, Mirta Edit Longhini, Maria DeMiguel, Maria Fabiana Zan elli, Dante Leone, Norberto Rene Serenelli, Alejandro Molina Carranza, (78 in 1:18-cv-02416-JPO-KHP) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A., ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc, Wells Fargo Delaware Trust Compan y, Wells Fargo Bank Northwest N.A., (209 in 1:17-cv-02987-JPO-KHP, 209 in 1:17-cv-02987-JPO-KHP) MOTION to Strike Document No. (175) or. MOTION to Dismiss The Third Amended and Consolidated Class Action Complaint. filed by We lls Fargo Delaware Trust Company, NA, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank NorthWest, N.A., (128 in 1:17-cv-02987-JPO-KHP) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . filed by Wells Fargo Delaware Trust Co mpany, NA, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank NorthWest, N.A., (134 in 1:17-cv-07034-JPO-KHP) MOTION to Amend/Correct . filed by Alex Adolfo Sraier, Marcelo Redlich, Silvano Luis Arnaldi, Pablo Ma ccarone, Delmo Francisco Cadario, Maria Irma Gonzalez, Magdalena Maria Becu, Julio Garcia Garcia, Vicente Di Loreto, Veronica Micaela Barbera, Matias Juan Mendy, Pedro Charquia Aguirre, Mario Alejandro Speroni, Emilio Enrique Martinez Granados, Nor berto Fermani, Eduardo Sogno, Rafael Argul, Concepcion Marta Grillo, Warne Financial Corp., Oscar Alberto Varde, Felipe Fiorellino, Carlos Adrian Rodriguez, Luis Sebastian Mogno, Eduardo Rodriguez, Juan Manuel Vaquer, Jorge Aidar Bestene, C ongrats Networking Corp., Roberto Omar Ricci, Laura Cecilia Wrobel, Leonardo Juan Ionfrida, Zulema Noemi Ramona Romano, Horacio Nestor Acebedo, Eduardo Jorge Gnecco, Guilermo Omar Iribarren, Juan Pablo Perez Candreva, Jose Luis Ghiggia, Maria Ines Ernestina Bossisio Verdaguer, Raul Daniel Fernandez, Gustavo Armando Figuerola, Renato Salvador Materia, Norberto Oscar Tonanti, Alfredo Federico Rossi, Celia Maria Perez, Sergio Daniel Fermani, Lentaun S.A., Ricardo Hector Valls, Jorge Perez Ju reidini, Jose Mesropian, Victor Angel Di Buccio, Federico Bersaiz, Humberto Nebar Bellocchio, Florencia Maria Murray, Vera Dorotea Baylon, Ernesto Fernandez LLorente, Fernando Nicolas Serra Rojas, Estela Susana Elena, Teresa Moschini, Emiliano Chaud, Aldo Pedro Duscher, Jose Maria Pena Fernandez, Clide Esther Martinez, Adrien Vicente Aspromonte, Maria Rosa LaPlacette, Anibel Ratibel, Emiliano Rodriguez, Patricia Noemi Delistovich, Patricio Devoto, Lucas Matias Licht, Roberto Raul Zapat a, Enrique Jose Goldaracena, Roberto Raul Sanjuro, Saul Raznoszczyk, Jorge Luis Speroni, Gabriel Marino, Beatriz Gladys Gualdoni, Maria Cristina Frova, Carlos Daniel Gandulfo, Romina Fermani, Vincenzo Aspromonte, Matias Sebastian Mena, (77 in 1: 18-cv-00128-JPO-KHP) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Delaware Trust Company, ATC Realty Fifteen Inc., Wells Fargo Bank Northwest N.A., (98 in 1:17-cv-06087-JPO-KHP) MOTION f or Judgment on the Pleadings . filed by Wells Fargo Delaware Trust Company, NA, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank NorthWest, N.A., (215 in 1:17-cv-02987-JPO-KHP) MOTION to Amend/Correct . f iled by Fundacion Fiorenzo, Roberto Jose Materia, Jose Luis Patrignani, Dario Osmar Ascune, Jorge Luis Germino, Ricardo Osvaldo Bluthgen, Alehandro Jose Laborde, Marcelo Mario De Angelis, Silvano Luis Arnaldi, Luis Felipe Lopez Blanco, Juan Jose Etala, Pablo Maccarone, Delmo Francisco Cadario, Jorge Alfredo Elias, Matias Luis Coll, Gustavo Canil, Sabino Alvarez Salgueiro, Marcelo Herman Loffreda, Magdalena Maria Becu, Francisco Alberto Di Maio, Adrian Roberto Materia, Francisco Miguel, Vicente Di Loreto, Alejandro Jose Laborde, Matias Juan Mendy, Tafina Establishment, Liliana Noemi Stellato, Hortensia Dominga Teresa Gutierrez Posse, Frederico Alvarez, Haisan Samman, Emilio Enrique Martinez Granados, Flint Consultant Ltd., A nna Maria Jorgelina Noguerol, Maria Cristina Rodriguez, Jorge Esteves, Patricia Boorman De Solari Loudet, Eduardo Sogno, Susana Mariel Alonso, Guillermo Ariel Pereyra, Concepcion Marta Grillo, Antonio Emilio Pergomet, Guillermo Walter Benelli, Gus tavo Materia, Jorge Goyes, Silvana Montefiore, Martin Rodolfo Castro, Maria De La Caridad Gurnbaum, Marta Susana Cadario, Oscar Alberto Varde, KP Ventures S.A., Maria Balsano, Ulises Daniel Varela Damboriana, Carlos Adrian Rodriguez, Luis Seba stian Mogno, Rafael Leonardo De La Torre Mendoza, Natalia LOYATO, Fraida Kahan, Alejandro Enrique Julio Berger, Nancy Carlota Bain, Pablo Gabriel Potokski, Miguel Carlos Blanco, Marcelo De Leo, Gabriel Manuel Fernandez, Roberto Omar Ricci, Carlos A. Menendez, Jose Maria Cabrera, Jorge Enrique Gilardi, Laura Cecilia Wrobel, Leonardo Juan Ionfrida, Maria Concepcion Teresa Muller, Narja Investments Corp., Oscar Alberto Frei, Maria Teresa Del Carmen Correa Avila, Cristian Iturralde, Zulema Noemi Ramona Romano, Javier Jorge Oscar Silva, Felix Luis LEBORGNE,, Horacio Nestor Acebedo, Christine Alice Marie Marcelle Verse, Melburne S.A., Santos Di Giambattista, Gabriel Alejandro Del Campo, Diego Cuesta Silva, Jelifl Corp., Juan Pab lo Perez Candreva, Jose Luis Ghiggia, Nelida I. Vazquez, Maria Ines Ernestina Bossisio Verdaguer, Raul Daniel Fernandez, Luis Miguel Girardotti, Ana Maria Krieger, Jorge A. Moyana, Ana Cecilia Materia, Sabino Javier Alvarez, Juan Jesus Gil Juncal, Ad riana Cappone, Victor Miguel Jamui, Daniel Nicolas Juansaras, Martin Miranda, Daniel Alberto Aramburu, Ulan Bator Project Ltd, Julio Ariel Martinez, Maria Beatriz Marquinez, Luis Ramiro Aviles, Alfredo Federico Rossi, Eva Friedman, Tomas Del Ca rril, Gonzalo Sanchez Puppulo, Marcello Luis De Leo, Celia Maria Perez, Plaza Asset Management Co., LTD, Pablo Leonardo Sacco, Distribuidora De Productos Quimicos S.A., Marta Graciela Cecati, Horacio Daniel HOLCMAN, Eduardo Dario Avruj, Jorge An selmo Fernandez, Susana Carmen Carniglia, Ricardo Szily, Ricardo Luis Gentile, Carlos Jorge Campioni, Guillermo Castillo, Silvio Roberto Donato, Gustavo Cachiarelli, Sonia Benvenuto, Alejandra Graciela Paturau, Raquel Iris Robustelli, Graciela Si lva Siguenza, Marcelo Sugier, Olga Ines Muro de Nadal, Emiliano RODRIGUEZ, Tomas Victoriano Herrero, Diana Ana Maria Severin, Francisco Javier Gomez Ronco, Mariano Pablo Caillot Bois, Carlos Alfredo Grimaldi, Juan Carlos Soldano, Gerardo Collardin , Southern Services Company Corp., Luis Maria Games, Jorge Carlos Macellaro, Jorge Perez Jureidini, Claudio Bruno Bartoli, Milda Beatriz Maseras, Diego Esteban Chami, Raul Alberto Genchi, Federico Bersaiz, Benjamin Alberto Bystrowicz, San Goal , Christine A Verse, Osvaldo J. Barrionuevo, Maria Steinnekker, Lucas Gustavo De Feo, Alberto M. Pomato, Luis Leborgne, Juan Enrique Roberts, Victor Roberto Poggi, Rodrigo Hernan Meyer, Foxtom Assets Inc., Ernesto Fernandez LLorente, Ana Maria N ora Krieger, Matias Rodolfo Meyer, Rut Veronica Ladanyi, CBM Agente de Valores S.A.,, Alfonso Eduardo Espino Paz, Daniel Floreal Fognini, Maria Victoria Miranda, Elsa Beatrice Ledesma, Alicia Bonastro, Alfredo Gregorio Rodriguez, Silvana Perez, Manuel Juan Herrera Grazioli, Cesar Emilio Zucchino, Lucila Atucha, Marco Alberto Panettieri, Carlos Alfredo Oliva, Paz Veronica Chartier Campagne, Emiliano Chaud, Ruth Naomi Ladner, Rafael Mendoza de la Torre, Jose Maria Pena Fernandez, Norma Bea triz Cianciarulo, Clide Esther Martinez, Manuel Cuesta Silva, Mario Rafael De Dona, Adrien Vicente Aspromonte, Maria Rosa LaPlacette, Hugo Baquerin, Maria Lucila Rodriguez Carniglia, Patricia Noemi Delistovich, Caja Municipal De Jubilaciones Y P ensiones De Nogoya, Sonia Maricel Baravalle, Marcelo Hernan Loffreda, Patricio Devoto, Jose Julio Mansilla Lami, Daniel Gomez Cusco, Gabriel Erkekdjian, Carlos Alberto Gimenez Hutton, Martin Ricardo Miranda, Pablo Codevilla, Carlos Alberto Nico las Johanson, Monica Huisman, Martin Juan LANG, Hugo Leonardo Carlini, LENTAUN S.A., Lucilla Elena Paillard Polero, Mariano Jorge Miranda, Maria DeMiguel, Maria Elena Gonzalez, Aldo Bertolozzi, Juan Carlos Guaita, Esteban Alberto Materia, Rica rdo Pujals, Roberto Raul Sanjuro, Claudio Daniel Husain, Fernando R. Freixas Pintos, Monica Urresti, Francisco Alberto Ruete, Ramon Hector Abrigador, Diego Salvadore Di Maggio, Norberto Vicente Rodriguez, Hugo Omar Barca, Flowyard Overseas Ltd. , Susana INees Herrera, Daniel Alberto Passaro, Diego Luis Rios, Norberto Rene Serenelli, Enrique Pedro Coscia, Cesar R Zucchino, Jorge Daniel Diz, Carlos Alberto Gimenez Huttorn, Alejandro Saul Kordon, Cecelia Elsa Pizzini, Paula Radizzani Helgue ra, Matias Sebastian Mena, Monica Gallegos, Juan Carlos SACCO, Daniela Iris Rossen, Diana Materia, Ricardo Roberto Eduardo Pujals, Graciela Stella Maris Magliano, Ricardo Manuel Gutierrez, Alex Adolfo Sraier, Marcelo Redlich, Maria Rosa Irma Mat eria, Silvia Del Rosal, Jose Luis Villanueva Ahumada, Fernando Enrique Granda, Gustavo Pittalugu, Hector Ruben Bircz, Juan Martin De la Serna, Maria Cecilia Brigante, Luciano Herrera Grazioli, Enrique Horacio Mirkin, Esteban Mazzuco, Maria I rma Gonzalez, Maximiliano Calp, Lucila Elena Paillard Polero, Julio Garcia Garcia, Julian Ariel Martinez, Fernando Antonio Garabato, Hugo Basilotta, Veronica Micaela Barbera, Diana Irene Alvarez, Josue Maximiliano Bauerberg, Blambus Group Inc., Pedro Charquia Aguirre, Maria Elisa Salerno, Mario Alejandro Speroni, Miguel Barton, Norberto Fermani, Guillermo Schleicher, Juan Antonio Virag, Rafael Argul, Miguel Fernandez Moores, Bernardo Romeo, Osvaldo H. Scandola, Alicia S. Negreira, Di ego Di Maggio, Juan Jose Acoglani, Fernando Lucas Luis Garcia Urrutia, Eva M.V. Berkes de Kolb, Warne Financial Corp., Fernando Raul Benedetto, Monica Patricia Morena, Magdalena Guzman, Romulo Bernadino Mena, Martin Furlong, Juan Carlos Affi f, Felipe Fiorellino, Enrique Gualterio Negus, Maria Rita Lopez Provera, Vanina Laura Coluccio, Eduardo Tuzzio, Juan Horacio Busanello, Ernesto Miguel Torre, Elsa Maria Elvira Zarlenga, Eduardo Rodriguez, Estaban Alberto MATERIA, Alberto Lamm, Roque Manuel Oliver, Maria Cristina Fabricant, Pedro Vigneau, Bryant Line Corp., Leonardo Rodriguez, Juan Manuel Vaquer, Conaiss Holding S.A., Torcuato Luis Battaglia, Jorge Aidar Bestene, Juana Monica Wehmeyer, Guido Emilio Degano, Congrats Networking Corp., Rodolfo Centeno, Martina Galli, Miguel Angel Lopez, Juan Jose Comerio, Susana Ines Herrera, Graciela Cassutti, Martin Saenz Valiente, Eduardo Jorge Gnecco, Jose Antonio Garcia, E-Sense Ltd., Alejandra Maria Bossetti, DAniel O scar De Giorgio, Rafael Leonardo Mendoza De La Torre, Pablo Jose Rodriguez Falcon, Cristian Horacio Ernst, Hector Jorge Gonzalez, Carlos Alberto Wehbi, Frontosa Limited, Gullermo Benelli, Tomas Guiraldes, Claudio Steudle, Ricardo Juan Garbarino, Walter Alfredo Jakob, Veronica Balbiani, Gustavo Armando Figuerola, Beatriz Julia Megy, Renato Salvador Materia, Maximiliano Costa, Ana Maria Steinnekker, Ana Ines Wilson, Alan Jose Horwitz, Enrique ZANIN, Eugenia Agustina Cerda, Maria Alicia De lfa Craviotto, Norberto Oscar Tonanti, Jalid Alberto Del Azar, Aldo Antonio Materia, Pablo Rodriguez Falcon, Miguel Sanchez De Bustamante, Adrian Marcelo Materia, IJECT, INC., Ruben Angel Valsagna, Jurge Luis Fernandez, Beatriz Edith De La Torre , Maria Candela D'Angelo, Nicolas Eduardo Bowen, Hugo A Untersander, David Fabian Huberman, Fernando Matarazzo, Christine ALice MArie Mar Verse, Pablo Fabian Gomez, Pablo Caride, Jorge Alberto Forlano, Jose Tedesco, Sergio Daniel Fermani, Carlos Adrian Ferreti, Mauro Giacometti, Arnaldo Manuel Gomez, Maria Isabel Jankowski de Sym Smith, Maria Cristina Villanueva, Ferdenas Holding LTD., Ana Ester Giordani, Ricardo Jose Hermida, Manual Atilio Iturralde, Alejandro Graciela Paturau, F abian Eduardo Angelilli, Miriam Beatriz Fratini, Edgardo Alfredo LOMBI, York Venture Capital, Ricardo Hector Valls, Jose Mesropian, Carlos Jose Benassi, Roberto Teobaldo Biagioni, Victor Angel Di Buccio, Nora San Juan, Humberto Nebar Bellocchio, Ines Maria Iturraldo, Gustavo Alberto Urrutia, Alberto Martinez, Estaban Mazzuco, Jose Elias Gondolo, Florencia Maria Murray, Eduardo Escudero, Blanca Beatrice Maria Kinbaum, Cecilia Inchausti, Carlos Alberto Brignone, Jose Antonio Garcia Garc ia, Vera Dorotea Baylon, Juan Sebastian Salaber, Jorge Norberto Garcia Cozzi, Maria Lucila Rodriguea Carniglia, Enrique Hector Pagliettini, Marcelo Alejandro Sugier, Camilo Patrignani, Maria Laura Travella, Fernando Nicolas Serra Rojas, Estela Su sana Elena, Elizabeth Boote, Miguel Angel Calgaro, Sergio Roman Morgenstern, Alfredo Eduardo Terzano, Adriana Mabel Nieto, Teresa Moschini, Maria Teresa Borrell Fortuny, Alfredo M. De Baisio, Maria Paola Geranio, Gonzalo Blaquier, Marta Alicia Ha ppar, Jose Luis Gonzalez, Carlos Armando Donino, Eduardo Maximo Del Torto, Enrique Horacio Picado, Fernando Juan Fernandez, Hugo Alberto Untersander, Aldo Pedro Duscher, Miguel Angel Cirio, Basic Fly Ltd., GracielaSiguenza, Diego Grimaldi, Don Satur Srl, Maria Pia Saure, Moises Luis Kotler, Daniel Enrique De Cabo, Giselle Erkekdjian, Edmundo Humberto Kindsvater, Anibel Ratibel, Elena Celina Rosa Marun, Erika Bienek, Dora N. Escribano, Moises Luis Cotler, Ramon Enrique REQUESENS PAZ,, H ector Jorge Areco, Sebastian Gil Gilgarro, Domingo Pittaluga, Lucas Matias Licht, Mirta Edit Longhini, Guillermo Jose Campos, Alejandro Berger, Raul Oscar Ferrari, Manuel Herrera, Alberto Armoni, Fabricio Terzano, Silvio Roberto Damian Donato, Roberto Raul Zapata, Jose Antonio Gonzalez, Sergio Lucero, Fafal Corp., Sebastian Gil Garro, Carlos Gurmendi, Enrique Alberto Fuertes, Claudio Doller, Carlos Gabriel Miyagi, Prenton Industry Ltd, Maria Clotilde Josefi Lami Hernandez, Maria F abiana Zanelli, Enrique Jose Goldaracena, Mario Luis Gimenez, Dante Leone, Saul Raznoszczyk, Jorge Luis Speroni, Alejo Gonzalez Garano, Martin Arturo Carmona, Gabriel Marino, Salvador Toscano, Jose Rispau Vinas, Beatriz Gladys Gualdoni, Enri que Matias Hayzus, Mirta Garcia De La Fuente, Guilermo Omar Iribarren, Maria Cristina Frova, Maria Elba Oleaga, Domingo Mazzitelli, Kim Dai San, Diego Rodolfo Angelo Pape, Carlos Daniel Gandulfo, Romina Fermani, Alejandro Molina Carranza, Joaquin Martinez Tenreiro, Claudio Javier Glazman, Estaban Alberto Materia, Vincenzo Aspromonte, Roxana Catalano. For the foregoing reasons, the Wells Fargo Defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED in part and DENIED in pa rt. The Wells Fargo Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is GRANTED. The Wells Fargo Defendants' motion to strike is DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend is DENIED.The Clerk of Court is d irected to close the following motions: Docket Numbers 128, 209, and 215 in Aviles, No. 17-CV-2987; Docket Numbers 98 and 142 in Benedetto, No. 17-CV-6087; Docket Numbers 97 and 134 in Acebedo, No. 17-CV-7034; Docket Numbers 77 and 116 in Alvarez, No. 18-CV-128; and Docket Numbers 78 and 112 in Areco, No 18-CV-2416. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/6/2020) (js)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 261 NOTICE REGARDING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE: As a means to increase efficiencies and improve the quality of telephonic court conferences, the parties shall be required to use the services of CourtSolutions LLC ("CourtSolutions") in the above -captioned case for the telephonic conference scheduled on Wednesday, March 25, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. CourtSolutions is a service only and does not set or schedule hearings for the Court. and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/19/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-02987-JPO-KHP, 1:17-cv-06087-JPO-KHP, 1:17-cv-07034-JPO-KHP, 1:18-cv-00128-JPO-KHP, 1:18-cv-02416-JPO-KHP (rro)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(3) and (b) (4), that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, video conference, or other remote means, and may be recorded by any reliable audio or audiovisual means . This order does not dispense with the requirements set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(5), including the requirement that ("[u]nless the parties stipulate otherwise") the deposition be "conducted before an officer appointed or desig nated under Rule 28," and that the deponent be placed under oath by that officer. In light of the current pandemic, the court reporter may attend the deposition and administer the oath via the same remote means (e.g., telephone conference call or video conference) used to connect all other remote participants, and so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. It is further ORDERED, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4), t hat all unexpired deadlines for the completion of fact depositions, fact discovery, expert depositions, expert discovery, and/or all discovery are hereby EXTENDED for a period of 60 days, together with all post-discovery deadlines previously set by this Court. Nothing in this Order prevents the parties from seeking to further modify the pretrial schedule in this action in light of the COVID-19 pandemic (or for any other good cause). Prior to seeking such relief, the parties must, as alwa ys, meet and confer (via remote means) in a good faith effort to reach agreement on how best to fulfil the goals of Rule 1 while avoiding unnecessary health risks. For the March 25, 2020 10:00 a.m. telephone conference, the parties should dial the following phone number (and not the number at ECF 256): (866) 434-5269. The access code is: 4858267. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/16/2020) ( Telephone Conference set for 3/25/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-02987-JPO-KHP, 1:17-cv-06087-JPO-KHP, 1:17-cv-07034-JPO-KHP, 1:18-cv-00128-JPO-KHP, 1:18-cv-02416-JPO-KHP (ks)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER CONVERTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE: The Case Management Conference in this matter scheduled for Wednesday, March 25, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby converted to a telephonic conference. Counsel for the parties are d irected to call Judge Parker's Chambers at the scheduled time with counsel for all parties on the line. Please dial 212-805-0234. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 3/25/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/12/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-02987-JPO-KHP, 1:17-cv-06087-JPO-KHP, 1:17-cv-07034-JPO-KHP, 1:18-cv-00128-JPO-KHP, 1:18-cv-02416-JPO-KHP (va)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER NO. 35 MEMORIALIZING FEBRUARY 20, 2020 STATUS CONFERENCE : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT 1. Upon service of this Order, the Obligated Parties are required to preserve all Subject Documents in their possession, custody, or control. 2. The Oblig ated Party's duty to preserve all Subject Documents shall remain in effect until further Order of this Court. If any of the Subject Documents are scheduled to be destroyed or discarded in accordance with an Obligated Party's existing docum ent retention policy, that policy shall be immediately suspended for any documents that constitute Subject Documents, and the Subject Documents shall be preserved in accordance with this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/6/2020) (ks) Modified on 3/6/2020 (ks).
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER: As discussed during yesterday's status conference, Defendants Smith and Marcum shall file a letter by no later than December 6, 2019 advising whether they will oppose Plaintiffs' request to amend all five Complaints to assert the Edge Act as a basis for subject matter jurisdiction over Defendant Wells Fargo. Plaintiffs shall have until December 13, 2019 to submit a motion seeking leave to effectuate service through alternative means, as permitted under Federal Rule of Civ il Procedure 4, on those Defendants who have not yet been served. Case Management Conferences are hereby scheduled on the following dates and times: January 29, 2020 at 2:00 p.m.; February 19, 2020 at 10:30 a.m.; March 25, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.; Apr il 27, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.; May 26, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.; June 22, 2020 a 10:00 a.m.; July 27, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.; August 24, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.; September 21, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.; October 26, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.; November 23, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.; Decem ber 14, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. All conferences will take place in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. The parties are directed to submit a joint letter providing an agenda and outlining disputed issues one week prior to each conference . In advance of the upcoming January 29, 2020 conference, the parties' joint letter should also include a proposed schedule for discovery relating to Plaintiffs' fraudulent inducement claims. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ka tharine H. Parker on 12/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-02987-JPO-KHP, 1:17-cv-06087-JPO-KHP, 1:17-cv-07034-JPO-KHP, 1:18-cv-00128-JPO-KHP, 1:18-cv-02416-JPO-KHP( Motions due by 12/13/2019., Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2020 a t 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge K atharine H. Parker., Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Case Management Conference set for 5/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., C ase Management Conference set for 6/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Case Management Conferen ce set for 9/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 be fore Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Case Management Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (ks)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 12/2/2019) (ks)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 OPINION AND ORDER: re: (60 in 1:17-cv-06087-JPO) MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Delaware Trust Company, NA, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank NorthWest, N.A., ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc., (49 in 1:18-cv- 02416-JPO) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo Bank Northwest N.A., Wells Fargo Delaware Trust Company, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc, (29 in 1:18-cv-00128-JPO) MOTION to Dismiss filed by S&P Global, Inc., (58 in 1:17-cv-06087 -JPO) MOTION to Dismiss filed by S&P Global, Inc., (55 in 1:17-cv-07034-JPO) MOTION to Dismiss filed by S&P Global, Inc., (91 in 1:17-cv-02987-JPO) MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Marcum, Roy G Smith, Portsmouth Settlement Company I LLC, (86 in 1:1 7-cv-02987-JPO) MOTION to Dismiss filed by S&P Global, Inc., (54 in 1:18-cv-02416-JPO) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Roy G. Smith, John Marcum, Portsmouth Settlement Company I, LLC, (57 in 1:17-cv-07034-JPO) MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Delaware Trust Company, Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc., (31 in 1:18-cv-00128-JPO) MOTION to Dismiss the Original Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank Northwest N.A., We lls Fargo Delaware Trust Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., ATC Realty Fifteen Inc., (34 in 1:18-cv-00128-JPO) MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Marcum, Roy G. Smith, Portsmouth Settlement Company 1, LLC, (47 in 1:18-cv-02416-JPO) MOTION to Dismiss filed by S&P Global, Inc., (63 in 1:17-cv-06087-JPO) MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Marcum, Roy G Smith, Portsmouth Settlement Company I, LLC, (60 in 1:17-cv-07034-JPO) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Roy G. Smith, John Marcum, Portsmouth Settlement Company I, LLC, (88 in 1:17-cv-02987-JPO) FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Delaware Trust Company, NA, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank NorthWest, N. A., ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, S&P, the Lifetrade Movants, and the Wells Fargo Defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. All claims against Portsmouth are dismissed for lack of personal juri sdiction. Counts One, Two, Four, Five, Six, Seven, Eight, Fourteen, Fifteen, Sixteen, Eighteen, Nineteen, and Twenty-One are dismissed in full. Counts Nine, Ten, Seventeen, and Twenty are dismissed as to those Plaintiffs who invested in the Lifetrade Funds prior to April 24, 2011. And Counts Three, Eleven, Twelve, Thirteen, Twenty-Two, Twenty-Three, and Twenty-Four survive in full. Defendants shall file their answers to the remaining claims within 21 days of the date of this Opinion and Order. T he Clerk of Court is directed to close the following motions: Docket Numbers 86, 88, and 91 in Aviles, No. 17 Civ. 2987; Docket Numbers 58, 60, and 63 in Benedetto, No. 17 Civ. 6087; Docket Numbers 55, 57, and 60 in Acebedo, No. 17 Civ. 7034; Docket Numbers 29, 31, and 34 in Alvarez, No. 18 Civ. 128; and Docket Numbers 47, 49, and 54 in Areco, No. 18 Civ. 2416. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/28/2019) (ama)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aviles et al v. S&P Global, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Ramiro Aviles
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gullermo Benelli
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Berger
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Ruben Bircz
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Osvaldo Bluthgen
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Maria Cabrera
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Canil
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Leonardo Carlini
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Codevilla
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matias Luis Coll
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Teresa Del Carmen Correa Avila
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises Luis Cotler
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcello Luis De Leo
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego Di Maggio
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Daniel Diz
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvio Roberto Donato
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristian Horacio Ernst
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Adrian Ferreti
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Alberto Forlano
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fundacion Fiorenzo
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Garcia
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sebastian Gil Gilgarro
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Miguel Girardotti
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Javier Gomez Ronco
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Gonzalez
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Golzalez
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando E Granda
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Herrera
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Victoriano Herrero
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Huisman
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Maria Krieger
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KP Ventures S.A.
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela Stella Maris Magliano
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Beatriz Marquinez
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Martinez
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Matarazzo
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Mendoza de la Torre
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariano Jorge Miranda
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Miranda
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Gabriel Miyagi
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvana Montefiore
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Patrignani
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Horacio Picado
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucilla Elena Paillard Polero
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Gabriel Potokski
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Roberto Poggi
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prenton Industry Ltd
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Pujals
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego Luis Rios
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norberto Vicente Rodriguez
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Rodriguez Falcon
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalo Sanchez Pupullo
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela Silva Siguenza
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcelo Sugier
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo A Untersander
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulan Bator Project Ltd
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine A Verse
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Antonio Virag
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Alberto Wehbi
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar R Zucchino
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&P Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NorthWest, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Delaware Trust Company, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITM Twentyfirst LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portsmouth Settlement Company I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy G Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?