Abrams et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia et al
Plaintiff: Blanche Alejandro, Aldo Antonio, Neil Attardi, Barry Aissatou, Jan Bachusz, Telma Alvarado, Hernan Alvarez, Howard Abrams, Aluko Mose, Wilmer Andrade, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Arnaldo Almonte, Vladimir Akoulov, Tony Agyman, Kirk Hohensheldt, Jose Sobral, Susan Latham, Peter C. Zaun, Jerzy Czypinisz, David Kogan, Felix Calle, Peter A. Gargano, Ramona Ramirez, Michelle Berti, Luis B. Garcia, Carlos Cardenas, Michael Hunt, Tadeusz Milek, Jean-Anne Mackrell, Brian Kemp, Czeslaw Jagiello, Thomas Maloney, Rudolph Dyer, Anibal Rodriguez, Joseph Wimmer, Doris Martinez, Phillip R. Bryant, Arina Bakhareva, Julio Repetto, Barry Bryan, John Dobies, Michael Pignatelli, Richard C. Williams, Juan Carlos Roa, Stanislaw Pszeniczny, Walter R. O'Donnell, Piotr Matuszewski, Joseph Maddaloni, Enrico Frase, Debbie Morales, Antoni Lelek, Wynelle Welch, Julio C. Lliguicota, Manuel Garcia, Omar Ulffe, Gwendolyn Brandt, Gustavo Iturralde, Igor J. Makar, Deborah Lupard, Gisel Castro, Russell Millar, Tadeusz Kowalewski, Robert A. Burmeister, George L. Velez, Jozef Galazka, Zbigniew Czachurski, Iliana Troya, Jose Emilio Gaviria, Rickie McKie, Teresa Morrone, Darryl Lee, Stanislaw S. Faltynowicz, Tokeato Carter, Witold Roginski, Jose A. Manrique, Herminio Tapanes, Hector Castro, Barbara Singleton, Gerard Ciquera, Jose Dumet, Gustavo Blandon, Ernestine Branch, Stanislaw Burzynski, Ramon Sola, Michael Browne, Shedricka Nesbitt, Juan Prada, Chiemene Jenkins, Ana Estrella, Juan B. Peralta, Mark Sly, Maritza Colon, Jan Dobrowolski, Lucyna Foremska, Kimete Velic, Juan Rakela, James T. Keller, Thomas McMahon, David Sharinn, Thomas Galligan, James E. McCullough, Richard Baker, Muriel Cunningham, Marlene Monteleone, Kenrick Nisbett, Stanislaw Dziadezykowski, Frank Ventimiglia, Louis Garcia, Candelaria Porras, Albert Talker, Halina Tapia, Ramiro Rodriguez, Edgar Munoz, Joseph Racanelli, Peter Giordano, Thomas Miraglia, Peter Seeman, William R. Mendez, Stanislaw Karpierz, German Sanchez, Robbill Mohammed, Maria Fajardo, Stephanie Campbell, Kristin McGrath, Rosa Diaz Alvarez, Carmen Mena, Michael Hafey, William Neary, Andrzej Lasica, Dariusz Bienduga, Robert Schnelle, Frances LaPointe, Michael Cioffi, Rafael Valdez, Peter Donahue, Thomas Harden, Allen Charles Garner, Allan Grier, William Schuchat, Charles Murphy, Ireneusz Mierzejewski, Demetrius Samadjopoulos, Ann Grant, Maria Chainoha, Albert McIntosh, Valeriy Lavruk, Richard J. Pearse, Fred J. Krines, Delicia Gary, Laura Whickum, Karen Eremita, Dioselina Quintana, Gersham Williams, Lena Fabian-Slim, Sonia Varela, Nathan Bednarsh, Linda Suwidji, Sylvia Schmitz, Vincent Sarcone, Kathleen Donavon, William Myerwold, Robert Perniciaro, William Fallon, Jozef Madej, Joseph A. Cella, Michael Bartone, Yvonne Salaman, Christopher Uszynski, Luis Calle, Jadwiga Galazka, Guillermo Osorio, Dennis Cassidy, Leverne Floyd, Dominick M. Montalto Jr., Pamela Gallichio, Rosa Espinoza, Andrew M. Santeramo, Leonardo Cano, George Lamoreaux, Raul Martinez Sr., Robert Dinnen, Alfonza Green, Michael McPhillips, Stephen M. Dietz, Rhoda Berger, Henryk Grabowski, Jose Siguachi, William J. Moise Jr., Joanne Felicetta, Ana Camacho, Guillermo Torres, Jose Collado, Clara Montague, Geraldo Martinez, Stanley Becton, Alexander Macias, Minerva Rivera, Raymond Schnarr, Sheila Boyette, Susan Lawrence, Gerome Cerverizzo, Rose Harris, Erwin Kirbach, Dara Simon, Howard Perry, Donna DeSoto, Joseph Montwaid, Lorenzo Pittman, James Sheehan, Arlene Ramery, Luz Stella Lopez, Jozef Z. Kruczak, Isioma Ogbue, Zygmunt Kwiatkowski, Patricia Workman, John Mescall, Louis Duclerc, Henry Lozano, George Echebiri, James G. Service, Claudia S. Bernstein, Mieczyslaw Smoderek, William Schmitt, William Parker, Jagjewan Ramroop, Joseph Belmonte, Barry Stevens, Adrian Pierce, Derek L. Partee, Jeffrey Scott Seide, Hopeton Malcolm, Melinda Figueroa, James Carriel, Richard Barnett, Jaroslaw Ludwiczak, Alexander Gorelik, Janina Frelas, Tommy Mendez, Yvonne Robinson, Kenneth L. Murray, Joseph Benbow, Ryan McGinty, John Patino, Vincent Fiorenza, Brion Stewart, Jose A. Batista, Joseph M. Urso, Quentin Kirkland, Daniel Venditti, Yudelka Collado, Robert Serrone, Gary Iorio, Daniel O'Brien, Yvette Griffins, Dallas Cromwell, Rosa Medina, Julie Harvey, Jose Llaverias, Mark Roseman, Coretta Callender-Faulk, Edward Lobue, Ryszard Obiedzinski, Jeffrey Bernstein, Richard Trotta, Jerzy Kadziela, Maria Marino, Joseph Savoca, Esteban Bueno, Anita Ferdinand, Joan M. Farrell, Lily Trofimoff, Errol Wynter, Paul Thyberg, Keith Kaplan, Michelle Bracey, Cheryl Simpkins, Maria Encarnacion, Patrick Colossi, Anthony Hall, Deveret M. Howell, John J. Dalton, Royal Eversley, Vanessa Pero, John Odia, Manuel Checo, Sonja Checinski, Jan Pomichowski, Kevin McPartland, Maria Hernandez, Miroslaw Binko, Todd Mayer, Surjit Saini, David Whalen, Stanislaw Radzieta, Richard Lennon, Thomas Joseph Cera, Neville Chung, Timothy Sullivan, Karen Reoch, Diovani Gutierrez, Maritza Liriano, Diana C. Matthews, Esperanza Munoz, Rose Wells, Robert Kabakoff, Jacek Sieka, Gennadiy Barykin, Mark Libecci, Howard Caplan, Germano Riviera, Hernan Munoz, Christine Clausi Petosa, Mark Clarke-Milton, Gabriel Pena, Juan Carlos Pena, Stewart Wilkins, Henryk Ciborowski, Andrejz Nerc, Linda Eaton-Lewis, Barbara Boursiquot, Joyce Keller, Marianne Leto, Mark Groblewski, Robert S. Chapman, Benjamin Rivers, Joffre Salinas, Tadeusz Kajda, Maria Fernanda Garcia, Paul Tacconi, John L. Kemp, Benjamin Jones, Ernest K. Matthews, Robert Sienkiewicz, Rose E. Gribben, Leszek Bieniek, William Dolan, Jozef Filipkowski, Elzbieta Ciborowska, Suvarna Shah, Marian A. Lizzio, Rosa Siguencia, Boguslaw Dlugosz, Waldemar Directie, Colombina Estrella, Eugene Gentile, Amy Krakow, Ruth Hermosilla, Robert E. McFeeley, Minerva Tross, Robert N. Schroh, Emeka Nwigwe, Bryant Williamson, Jorge Campoverde, Manuel Puli, Mark Gado, Kevin F. Robinson, Cindy Cheung, Jacqueline Morrison, Richard Delfino, Nelson Marty, Teresa Jurado, Heather Cabrera, Daniel Rodgers, Robert Park Borchert, Joseph P. Giamportone, Wladyslaw Barszcz, Angel Figueroa, Dennis Reilly, George Kaperonis, James J. Jenkins, Mathew Cusumano, Terence J. Smith, Rosemary Rodriguez, Alexis Monroe, Julio Mayorga, Miguel Nolasco, Mark S. Kelly, Joseph Russo, Barbara Minsky, Curtis Charles Mondesir, Lee Perlman, Frank Gianni, Jose A. Rivera, Gregory Voce, Anthony Santa Maria, Charles DeMarco, Sharon Jacobs, John H. Lavelle, Eugeniusz Jastrzebowski, William Otto Koladzyn, Franciszek Chojnowski, John Hickman, Tadeusz Pajerski, Jerkeida R. Grant, Debra Anne Monte, Waldemar Kapkowski, Mark Rothman, Israel Gil, Castrenze DiCarlo, Luis Martinez-Nicolas, Janusz Piersa, Oscar Perez, Oneil Parkes, Sam Roseman, Jonathan W. Socha, Lili Packer, Manuel Foranoce, Michael Barrett, Frank Degirolamo, Maxine Londner, Frank Taylor, Peter C. Maguire Jr., Juan Suarez, Minerva Toro, Deborah Washington, Rosaria J. Heide, John Napolitano, Sorel LaFaurie, Maria Perez-Delgado, Peter McGrath, Nino Montano, Thomas McHugh, Edwin Vargas, Jozef Pogorzelski, Joseph Chierchio, Dr. Donald Valerino, Aleksander Bajguz, Mohamed Jalloh, Patrick Okeefe, Nicolas Loaiza, John Toledo, Pawel Stepniewicz, Howard Kosta, Jose Morales Jr., Rance Louallen, Jason B. Lowenfeld, Milagros Fernandez, Piotr Majewski, Nicholas Moscato, Sonia M. Capon, Marian Retelski, Gregory Thomas, Fernando Baracaldo, Wanda I. Ortiz, William Mulzet, Victor Solis, Robert Fitzpatrick, Paul Stutz, Miguel Chung, David B. Sontz, Jozef Sokolowski, Liana Velasquez, Zdzislaw Langier, Marva M. White, Stanislaw Kubrak, George Pope Solomon, Priscilla Payne, Angela Calhoun, Jeffrey Kegler, Joseph McDonald, Michael Mulvaney, Sergiu Dumitrache, Carrie Cantey, Fain McKinney, John Bitsko, Trevor Berridge, Alan Brown, Josefina Rosado, Joseph Lewis, Jerimiah Jamison, Veronica Vasquez-Salinas, Richard F. Bergmann, Marcin Grabowski, Daniel Mackey, Galo Cordova, Miller M. Parra, Marian Kuczaj, Leonard Desilva, Dergeant James Donohue, Rabiah Gaynor, Robert Mandell, Walter Villafuerte, Thelmore Meeks, Maria Puello, Martha Sepulveda, Andrzej Badzio, Matthew Norton, Laurie Edwards, Pascual Llibri, Kathy Gibbs, Gerald Colon, Ronalda Nicholas-Frazier, Mario Valenzuela, Thomas F. King, David Levy, Anthony Vangeli, Heather Browne-Dee, Martha Bermudez, Dolores Suarez, Antonia Rivera, Ramiro Ramirez, John Jarvis, Jan Niedziela, Carlos L. Herrera, Jan Kozinski, Thomas Marucheau, Jose Santos Vaca, Wojciech Michalik, Denis Dooley, Phillip McQueen, Zbigniew Kucharski, Dariusz Chojnowski, Jose Naranjo, Michael Oliva, Dragica Roy, Rafael A. Velasco, Eunicestine Rutledge, Walter Silverman, Ruben Santos, George Gaffney, Steven Ruggiero, Gloria Llanes, Jozef Czubat, Volodymyr Lyseyko, Richard Filippazzo, Patrick Crowley, Christopher Tangney, Frank Gorglione, Jerry Morales, Volodymyr Khomik, Robert Conti, Simone Gallo, Doretha Middleton, Frances Benjamin, Jerzy Muszkatel, Milton Gordon, Patrick Hansen, Stanislaw Fic, Jorge Espinoza, Piotr Polak, William Lutter, Susana Martinez, Francisco Mite, Linus Korieocha, Edward Groger, Mary Ellen Hurd-Shy, Richard Sammarco, Alex Daikoku, Mark Gendel, James B. Troncoso Jr., Orlando Hernandez, Ed Nigri, Barbara Demarco, Zbigniew Mankiewicz, Ralph Salomone, Alonso Espinoza, Gag Gordova, Enoel Torres, Michael Thomas McPhillips, Vasilios Parthenis, Joseph Polidoro, Diane Lewis, Joseph Fitzgerald, Nilda Torres, Michal Brodacki, Paul Brobeck, Tadeusz Larwa, Samuel Kahan, Marian Maksimiuk, William I. Ramirezy, Janusz Marcinkowski, Rosa Nunez, Ramdial Sookhai, Carmen Marte, Ira Fogelgaren, Curtis Crowe, Elizabeth A. Miller, Utjok Zaidan, Yuriy Bilonozhenko, Greg McDonald, Romuald Cieslak, Emanuel R. Weisgras, Odessa Chin, Carlos Raul Gomez, Raymond Pose, Iris Ramirez, Virginia Ortiz, Raymond Cassar, Jose Luis Bello, Donna A. Fontana, Ignacy Rozanski, John P. Gorea Jr., Wandalesca Espinal, Francisco Cordova, Lawrence Pearson, Mozella Gatewood, Alexander Landi, Clay Calle, Margaret Nasta, Scott Wetter, Noel Velez, Matthew Henderson, Erika Espinosa, Teodulo Fiesta, Arlene Reddick, Milagros Figueroa, Richard Kiggins, Felix Santana, James Doran, Raymond Morales, Robert McAllister, Americo Rodriguez, Nubia Ramirez, Ryszard Gorecki, Jennifer A. Jacovino and Alex Anthony Sanchez
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia and Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina
Case Number: 1:2017cv04201
Filed: June 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331tt
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 80 LETTERS ROGATORY (Doc. #4702) ISSUED July 25, 2019, as to Cathy Hawara Assistant Commissioner, Appeal Canada Rvenue Agency, Connaught Building, 555 MacKenzie Avenue, 7the Floor, Ottawa, Ontario in Canada. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Mamdouh Mahmud Salim for October 8, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 07/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt) Modified on 7/15/2019 (dt). Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt). Picked up on July 16, 2019, by Jerry Goldman's Office
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Wadith elHage for October 7, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 07/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt) Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt). Picked up on July 16, 2019, by Jerry Goldman's Office
May 28, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number (4561) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(lb)
March 13, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for Benjamin D. Margo to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kellogg, Michael)
March 1, 2019 Filing 76 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (6 in 1:18-cv-11834-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom., (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy B. Fleming, #2 Exhibit Havlish Public Comments on USVSST Fund interpretations 6.29.16)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 75 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/4/2019 re: Briefing Schedule on Havlish-Hoglan Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Havlish-Hoglan Letter to Judge Netburn, #2 Exhibit B - PECs Letter to Judge Netburn)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying (479) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (833) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4287) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (500) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; denying (465) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (675) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; denying (586) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; denying (641) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (595) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (405) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (527) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; denying (367) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; denying (623) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (130) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; denying (285) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; denying (1003) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; denying (48) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; denying (408) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; denying (133) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (111) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; denying (75) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (104) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (114) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (72) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (79) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (67) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (65) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (47) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (32) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; denying (44) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; denying (18) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; denying (11) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; denying (402) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; denying (485) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; denying (1040) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (398) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; denying (404) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. Application DENIED. A request to defer the Court's written decision is not the proper way to bring additional relevant information to the Court's attention. Saudi Arabia's request to file a redacted version of its December 18, 2018 letter is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
December 20, 2018 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 72 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Return Date set for 1/3/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Report and Recommendation, #3 Exhibit List of Judgments, #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics 2018, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (12 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 70 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Return Date set for 1/2/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Mag. J. Report and Recommendation 7/12/16, #3 Exhibit List of Iran Judgments (not exhaustive), #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 18, 2018 Filing 69 LETTER MOTION for Discovery as filed under seal Docket No. 4280 on December 13, 2018 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J Maloney, III dated 12-18-2018. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Maloney, Andrew)
November 26, 2018 Filing 68 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Complaint in long form or in altered short form addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Timothy B. Fleming dated 11/26/2018. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 OPINION AND ORDER re: (3742 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' October 2017 motion for sanctions (ECF No. 3742) is DENIED. By September 28, 2018, Jelaidan is ORDERED to file a sworn declaration with the Court providing detailed responses to the questions listed above. In addition, a conference is scheduled for October 12, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 110, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. McMahon and the relevant members of the PECs are ORDERED to appear at the conference in person. The parties should be prepared to discuss the PECs' May 2018 motion for sanctions and McMahon's motion to withdraw. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3742. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/30/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 OPINION AND ORDER re: (4064 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (4043) Memorandum & Opinion, filed by Abdullah Omar Naseef, Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki, Adnan Basha, Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid. The Charity Officials' motion for reconsideration is DENIED. In addition, Mr. Alan Kabat, the Charity Officials' attorneys from Lewis Baach Kaufmann Middlemiss PLLC, and the appropriate representatives from the PECs are ORDERED to appear in person at the discovery conference scheduled for October 12, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 110, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The Court intends to discuss why Mr. Kabat made representations on behalf of Al-Turki and Naseef during periods of time when he was not in communication with those clients. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 4064. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/30/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 OPINION AND ORDER re: (3910 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Defendants, World Assembly of Muslim Youth-Saudi Arabia and World Assembly of Muslim Youth-International to to produce responsive documents pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(a), filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within 7 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to provide the PECs with a complete list of all of its branch offices from 1992 until 2002. Within 14 days of this Opinion and Order, the PECs are directed to provide WAMY with a list of no more than 20 branch offices that the PECs believe are most relevant to their claims. Within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to conduct a more thorough search for documents located in the 20 branch offices that the PECs identify and to produce any additional relevant documents. In addition, within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to search for and produce the following: all documents responsive to the PECs' fourth set of document requests; all reports, meeting minutes, and other documents from WAMY's governing bodies, boards, and committees; WAMY's annual reports for 1992, 1993, and 1995; all documents relating to WAMY's relationship with the Saudi government, Saudi ministries, and Saudi embassies; all documents relating to the Benevolence International Foundation; all records regarding WAMY's relationship with or financial support for Hamas, Fatah, and the Palestinian Islamic Jihad; and unredacted versions of all documents that WAMY has previously produced in redacted form (with the exception of any documents listed on a privilege log). Finally, within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to produce a sworn declaration describing in detail its efforts to locate: additional documents in its branch offices; all reports, meeting minutes, and other documents from WAMY's governing bodies, boards, and committees; documents relating to WAMY's relationship with the Saudi government; documents relating to the Benevolence International Foundation; and documents regarding WAMY's relationship with or financial support for Hamas, Fatah, and the Palestinian Islamic Jihad The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3910. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/29/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying (817) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4077) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (450) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (626) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (579) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (392) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (607) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (50) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (62) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (91) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (90) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (90) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (90) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (76) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (84) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (84) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (56) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (53) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (54) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (33) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (46) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (36) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (30) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (29) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (1024) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (391) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. The Kingdom's motion to supplement the protective order is DENIED. The Court will not adopt the procedures the Kingdom has proposed. Instead, the parties are directed to comply with the existing protective order, ECF No. 1900, and the Court's Individual Practices when they wish to file any information with the Court that has been designated as confidential. The Court's temporary order prohibiting parties from filing any documents on the docket that have been designated as confidential by the Kingdom (ECF No. 4079) is VACATED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 4077. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OPINION AND ORDER re: (3822 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Sanctions, filed by Plaintiffs PI Executive Committee, Plaintiffs Executive Committees, (3827 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Muslim World League and International Islamic Relief Organization to Produce Responsive Documents, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' motion for sanctions (ECF No. 3822) is DENIED as untimely. In addition, the PECs' motion to compel (ECF No. 3827) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, MWL and IIRO are ORDERED to search all of the branch offices that they have not already searched and produce any banking records from those offices and any documents falling within the categories identified in the Court's April 12, 2011 Order. MWL and IIRO are not required to search for any other documents at this time. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 3822 and 3827. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OPINION AND ORDER re: (872 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 3823 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Yasin Kadi to to produce documents, filed by Kathleen Ashton, (3830 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Yasin Kadi to Document Production, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, Kadi is ORDERED to search for and produce the two reports discussed above that were prepared in anticipation of Rowad's liquidation and the 11 documents discussed above regarding Saudi Arabia's investigations of Kadi. If he is unable to locate or obtain all of these reports and documents, Kadi is ORDERED to produce a sworn declaration within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order that describes in detail his efforts to locate the reports and documents. Kadi is not required to produce any other documents at this time. In addition, within 30 days of this Opinion and Order, the parties are directed to meet and confer and make good faith efforts to resolve the disputes regarding Kadi's privilege log. Finally, the PECs' request for attorneys' fees is treated as withdrawn, and Kadi's request for attorneys' fees is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 3823, 3830 in the MDL and ECF No. 872 in 02-CV-6977. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 22, 2018 Filing 61 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated August 22, 2018 re: (29 in 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN, 54 in 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN, 84 in 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN, 69 in 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN, 22 in 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN, 50 in 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN, 24 in 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN, 53 in 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN, 46 in 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN, 59 in 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN, 626 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN, 69 in 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN, 391 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN, 62 in 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN, 76 in 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN, 579 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN, 30 in 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN, 36 in 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN, 19 in 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN, 1024 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 84 in 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN, 817 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 90 in 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN, 91 in 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN, 607 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN, 90 in 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN, 4077 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 450 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN, 392 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN, 52 in 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN, 49 in 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN, 33 in 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN, 25 in 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN, 90 in 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN, 56 in 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN, 66 in 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN) LETTER MOTION for Discovery re Confidentiality Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated July 31, 2018. . Document filed by Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kellogg, Michael)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (4073) Letter Motion for Discovery; denying (4074) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. The motions for protective orders filed by Al-Buthe, Al-Obaid, Al-Turki, and Basha are DENIED, and Naseef's motion for a protective order is DENIED as moot. In addition, Naseef is ORDERED to file a letter within 60 days of the date of this Order and every 60 days thereafter updating the Court on the status of his medical conditions and ability to participate in this action. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 4073 and 4074. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/16/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 14, 2018 Filing 59 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated August 14, 2018 re: Document Production Status. Document filed by Kingdom of Saudi Arabia.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kellogg, Michael)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 8/27/2018, Doc. #4125 in case 1:03-md-1570. ORDER: No party shall publicly file any document on the docket designated as Confidential by the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia ("KSA") while the Court considers KSA's letter motion dated July 31, 2018. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees may respond to KSA's letter motion by August 8, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/1/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras) Modified on 8/28/2018 (ras).
July 31, 2018 Filing 57 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated July 31, 2018 re: Document Production Status. Document filed by Kingdom of Saudi Arabia.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kellogg, Michael)
July 31, 2018 Filing 56 LETTER MOTION for Discovery re Confidentiality Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated July 31, 2018. Document filed by Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confidentiality Proposal, #2 Exhibit B - Confidentiality Response)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kellogg, Michael)
July 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/3/2018. Replies due by 8/10/2018. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: On July 20, 2018, Defendants Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid, Abdullah Mahsen Al-Turki, Adnan Basha, and Abdullah Omar Naseef moved the Court to reconsider a portion of its July 6, 2018 Opinion and Order. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees may file a response to the motion by August 3, 2018. The defendants may file a reply by August 10, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/23/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 AMENDED ORDER APPROVING NOTICES TO CONFORM, SHORT FORM COMPLAINTS, AND NOTICES OF AMENDMENT: The Court has previously issued several orders approving forms and setting procedures for the filing of new claims against the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia ("Saudi Arabia") and the Islamic Republic of Iran ("Iran"). ECF Nos. 3543, 3982, 4010. Because of the piecemeal manner in which the various types of new claims have been addressed, the applicable forms and procedures have become convoluted and inconsistent. In addition, the plaintiffs have sought to find ways of adding more plaintiffs to a single case than the Court intended by utilizing a combination of short form complaints and notices of amendment. The Court is attempting to manage the influx of new cases and claims in the most efficient and organized manner possible. To that end, the Court will now establish new procedures governing all newly filed claims against Iran and Saudi Arabia. This Amended Order supersedes ECF Nos. 3543, 3982, and 4010 in their entirety. The parties are directed to adhere to both the letter and spirit of these procedures. In addition, any plaintiff wishing to withdraw from the case must seek leave from the Court to dismiss his or her claims in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Local Civil Rules, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/10/2018) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(jwh)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 OPINION AND ORDER re: (546 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN, 987 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 3748 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 774 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 571 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN, 850 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 630 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN, 582 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN) MOTION for Sanctions - Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Sanctions as to Charity Official Defendants Abdullah Omar Naseef, Abdullah Bin Saleh Al Obaid, Abdullah Mahsen Al Turki, Adnan Basha, and Soliman Al-Buthe. filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. For the foregoing reasons, the PECs' motion for sanctions is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants Al-Obaid, Al-Turki, Basha, and Naseef are precluded from offering any testimony or further evidence, other than such evidence that has been produced as of the date of this Opinion and Order, to rebut admissible evidence offered by a party to establish these defendants' whereabouts on a particular date. In addition, Defendants Al-Buthe, Al-Turki, Basha, and Naseef are ORDERED to produce certifications that fully comply with the Courts orders within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order. The certifications from Al-Turki, Basha, and Naseef must describe the specific medical issues that have prevented them from fulfilling their discovery obligations in a timely manner, and the certifications from Al-Turki and Naseef must indicate whether they are continuing to participate in this litigation. In the alternative, if Al-Turki, Basha, or Naseef is incapacitated, that defendant may produce a competent sworn or affirmed certification from a qualified treating physician identifying the specific medical issues that have prevented the defendant from fulfilling his discovery obligations. If defense counsel is unable to contact Al-Turki and Naseef, counsel must file a letter with the Court within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order describing his efforts to contact his clients and indicating when he last had contact with them. The Court will then consider whether a default should be entered against them. If the Charity Officials remain noncompliant with the Court's orders, the Court may impose additional sanctions and may order them to show cause why they should not be held in contempt. Finally, the Court will require the Charity Officials to pay the reasonable attorneys' fees and costs that the PECs incurred in bringing their motion for sanctions. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer and make good faith efforts to reach agreement on the reasonable attorneys' fees and costs. Within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, the parties shall file a joint status letter indicating whether they have agreed upon the attorneys' fees and costs that should be imposed. If the parties have not reached agreement, the status letter should propose a reasonable schedule for briefing on the amount of the attorneys' fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3748. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/6/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ne)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION: granting (804) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD; granting (4013) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (442) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD; granting (617) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; granting (573) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD; granting (386) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD; granting (599) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD; granting (42) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; granting (64) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; granting (81) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; granting (80) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; granting (80) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; granting (64) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; granting (80) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; granting (70) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; granting (54) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; granting (73) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; granting (44) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; granting (56) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; granting (74) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; granting (51) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; granting (47) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD; granting (48) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD; granting (41) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD; granting (27) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD; granting (29) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; granting (34) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD; granting (25) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD; granting (16) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD; granting (19) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD; granting (17) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD; granting (13) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD; granting (1017) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; granting (385) Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 4013 and the related motions in the consolidated cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/06/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ama)
June 6, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (4013 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 73 in 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN, 27 in 1:17-cv-06519-GBD, 70 in 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN, 617 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN, 599 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 29 in 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN, 16 in 1:18-cv-00538-GBD, 57 in 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN, 442 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 41 in 1:17-cv-06123-GBD, 385 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 48 in 1:17-cv-05471-GBD, 25 in 1:17-cv-08617-GBD, 56 in 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN, 81 in 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN, 386 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 64 in 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN, 74 in 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN, 80 in 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN, 44 in 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN, 64 in 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN, 17 in 1:18-cv-03162-GBD, 1017 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 13 in 1:18-cv-03353-GBD, 804 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 80 in 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN, 573 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 47 in 1:17-cv-05174-GBD, 42 in 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN, 51 in 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN, 19 in 1:18-cv-00947-GBD, 54 in 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN, 80 in 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN, 34 in 1:17-cv-07914-GBD) MOTION for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15144016. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(wb)
June 1, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15144016. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Dorris, Daniel)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Superseded by Judge's Order dated 7/10/2018, Doc. #4045 in case 1:03-md-1570. ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD; terminating (4007) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. The Court hereby approves the Iran Short Form Complaint, ECF No. 4007-1, and Ashton Short Form Saudi Arabia Complaint, ECF No. 4007-2, and further orders as follows: Iran Short Form Complaint. Any plaintiff who has not yet filed a claim against Iran, but intends to do so, may initiate an action against Iran through the filing of an Iran Short Form Complaint, substantially in the form attached as Exhibit A to the PECs' May 23, 2018 Letter, ECF No. 4007-1...As new complaints are being filed against Saudi Arabia, the Court would like to put all plaintiffs on notice that, in the event that liability is ultimately established against Saudi Arabia, solatium claimants shall be required to present documentary evidence of their family relationship to a 9/11 decedent for the Court's review. Such evidence would consist of birth or marriage certificates or, in their absence, sworn affidavits attesting to a family relationship eligible for recovery. For deceased solatium claimants, a death certificate or sworn affidavit shall be requested to ensure that the claimant did not predecease the 9/11 victim. Cf. ECF No. 3442, 3445 (orders vacating judgments against Islamic Republic of Iran and dismissing claims of solatium claimants who had pre-deceased victims). Although liability and damages are bifurcated in this case, the Court strongly encourages all plaintiffs to gather the necessary documentation before or shortly after the filing or amendment of their complaints because such documentation may be more difficult to obtain with the passage of time. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 4007, and as further set forth herein. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras) Modified on 8/28/2018 (ras).
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees' motion to modify the procedures for adding or removing plaintiffs to or from existing cases without seeking further leave from the Court is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. A new plaintiff asserting claims for solatium damages with respect to a deceased family member may be added to the existing case of the decedent's estate without seeking further leave from the Court by (1) filing a Notice of Amendment in the form attached hereto as Exhibit A, and then (2) adding the new plaintiff's name to the docket of the existing case on ECF. Names added onto the docket must be in First Name Last Name format, with only first letters capitalized (i.e., not written in all capitalized letters). No more than 25 new plaintiffs may be added to an existing case with a single Notice of Amendment. Attorneys wishing to add new plaintiffs using this procedure are strongly encouraged to contact the Clerk of Court and make arrangements to send members of their technical staff to court-sponsored training regarding the proper protocols for adding new plaintiffs to existing dockets. Plaintiffs added by this procedure need not re-serve defendants who have already been served. Any motion previously ruled on by the Court will be considered to have been filed and decided in the same manner and shall apply with equal force with regard to the claims of each new plaintiff. All other new plaintiffs must follow the procedures established in the Court's May 3, 2017 and January 24, 2018 Orders. ECF Nos. 3543, 3883 (in case no. 03md1570). Any plaintiff wishing to withdraw from the case must seek leave from the Court to dismiss his or her claims in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Local Civil Rules. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3943 (in case no. 03md1570). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/27/2018). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al., as per Chambers. This Order is a duplicate of doc. no. 3982 entered in case no. 03md1570. (rjm)
April 12, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Chun-Yang Shen on behalf of The Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Shen, Andrew)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying (760) Motion to Dismiss; granting (763) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD; denying (3667) Motion to Dismiss; granting (3670) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (414) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD; granting (568) Motion to Dismiss; denying (571) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (533) Motion to Dismiss; granting (536) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD; denying (359) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD; denying (557) Motion to Dismiss; granting (560) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD; granting (837) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (29) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (35) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (35) Motion to Dismiss; granting (38) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (34) Motion to Dismiss; granting (37) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (34) Motion to Dismiss; granting (37) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (35) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (25) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (22) Motion to Dismiss; granting (25) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; granting (22) Motion to Dismiss; denying (25) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (15) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (11) Motion to Dismiss; granting (14) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; granting (27) Motion to Dismiss; denying (30) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; granting (19) Motion to Dismiss; denying (22) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; granting (8) Motion to Dismiss; denying (10) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD; granting (14) Motion to Dismiss; denying (16) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD; denying (973) Motion to Dismiss; granting (976) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (358) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD. Defendant SHC's motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, (ECF No. 3670), is GRANTED. Defendant Saudi Arabia's motion to dismiss, (ECF No. 3667), is DENIED. Limited jurisdictional discovery on specific factual allegations critical to the immunity determination shall proceed promptly and expeditiously in the manner described above as to the alleged tortious acts by alleged Saudi agents Fahad al Thurnairy and Omar al Bayourni. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at ECF Nos. 3667 and 3670 accordingly. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/28/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (mro)
March 22, 2018 Filing 46 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (3939 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Letter filed by Dubai Islamic Bank. ENDORSEMENT: Attorney Robert G. Houck's motion to withdraw as counsel for Dubai Islamic Bank is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Attorney Houck as counsel. Attorney Robert G. Houck terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/22/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(ap)
March 5, 2018 Filing 45 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Michael K. Kellogg dated March 5, 2018 re: Response to Plaintiffs Letter of March 1. Document filed by Kingdom of Saudi Arabia.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kellogg, Michael)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: On Wednesday, January 24, 2018, the Court held a telephone conference with the parties to discuss the remaining disputes regarding the deposition protocol. The Court has decided the disputed matters and has separately issued a Deposition Protocol Order. For the sake of clarity, the Court will briefly explain its decisions regarding the disputed matters. First, the Court determined that each side will be permitted to take 75 depositions. The plaintiffs proposed 100 depositions as a fair number. This number was based, in part, on the plaintiffs' Rule 26(a) Witness List and their deposition protocol proposal, which identified dozens of individuals from each of the five organizational defendants and six individual defendants that they intended to depose. In addition, plaintiffs reference a 2015 multidistrict litigation (involving products liability) that authorized 100 depositions for each side and included damages depositions (which this protocol does not). The plaintiffs state that they intend to depose current and former employees of the defendant organizations, former government officials and incarcerated al Qaeda members. Defendants, for their part, argue first for 50 depositions, but in the main argue for parity, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/31/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ap) Modified on 2/1/2018 (ap). Modified on 2/2/2018 (ap).
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 DEPOSITION PROTOCOL ORDER: The United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") established In re Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001, 03 MDL 1570, and began transferring cases related to the 9/11 terrorist attacks from various judicial districts to this Court ("the MDL Court") for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. In addition to cases transferred into the MDL by the JPML, other cases related to the 9/11 terrorist attacks have been consolidated with this multidistrict proceeding (collectively, "MDL Proceeding"). A fundamental purpose of multidistrict litigation under 28 U.S.C. 1407 is to facilitate the conduct of efficient and non-duplicative discovery relating to questions of fact common to transferred and coordinated actions. The Parties have expressed an intention to conduct deposition discovery in the MDL Proceeding. Although several prior orders (see, e.g., ECF Nos. 247, 248, 1547, and 1900) contain provisions relating to depositions in the MDL Proceeding, the Court directed the Parties to meet and confer (see ECF No. 3541) to develop more specific protocols, and as further set forth in this order. (Deposition due by 1/31/2019.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/31/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ap)
January 25, 2018 Filing 41 OBJECTION to (599 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN, 3808 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Report and Recommendations Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kaplan, Robert)
January 18, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Oral Argument held on 1/18/2018 re: (3667 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, (3702 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss /Al Rajhi Bank's Notice of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. filed by Al Rajhi Bank, (3670 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina, (3691 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by National Commercial Bank, (3700 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Saudi Binladin Group. Plaintiff Counsel: Stephen A. Cozen, Sean P. Carter, J. Scott Tarbutton, Jodi W. Flowers, Robert T. Haefele, Jerry S. Goldman, Bruce E. Strong, Kanishka Agarwala, Robert Horkovich, John M. Quinn, James P. Kreindler, Andrew Joseph Maloney, III, Steven R. Pounian, Justin T. Green, Megan W. BenettDefense Counsel: Michael K. Kellogg, Benjamin D. Margo, Gregory G. Rapawy, Lawrence S. Robbins, Roy T. Englert, Jr., Lukman Aleez, Christopher M. Curran, Nicole Erb, Reuben J. Sequeira, Nicolle Kownacki, Mitchell R. Berger, Alan T. Dickey, Alexandra E. Chopin, James E. Gauch, Mark Kubisch, Esha Mankodi and Court Reporter present. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Vega, Elizabeth)
January 10, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin David Margo on behalf of Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Margo, Benjamin)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: granting #39 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/05/2018) (ama)
January 4, 2018 Filing 39 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file Objections addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Robert M. Kaplan dated January 4, 2018. Document filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Continental Casualty Comapny, Continental Casualty Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Transcontinental Insurance Company, Transportation Insurance Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kaplan, Robert)
January 4, 2018 Filing 38 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:17-cv-05471-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss ., (763 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss ., (25 in 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (27 in 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (37 in 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (37 in 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (560 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss ., (976 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (3670 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (19 in 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (8 in 1:17-cv-05174-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss ., (837 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (536 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss ., (14 in 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (568 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (38 in 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (37 in 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (22 in 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss . . Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Robbins, Lawrence)
January 4, 2018 Filing 37 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (3667 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (22 in 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (533 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss ., (22 in 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (35 in 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (11 in 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (359 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss ., (760 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss ., (34 in 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (25 in 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (358 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss ., (10 in 1:17-cv-05174-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss ., (571 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (25 in 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (35 in 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (973 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (414 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss ., (15 in 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (34 in 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (29 in 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (557 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss ., (34 in 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (35 in 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss ., (16 in 1:17-cv-05471-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss . . (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E, #6 Appendix F, #7 Appendix G)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kellogg, Michael)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled for Wednesday, January 24, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. The parties are directed to provide a call-in for the Court and all parties. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees and the Defendants' Executive Committee should each select one representative to speak on their behalf. The parties should be prepared to discuss several issues regarding the proposed deposition protocol. First, paragraph 7 of the proposed deposition protocol contemplates that merits and jurisdictional discovery will be completed within the same timeframe. The parties should be prepared to discuss whether depositions relating to jurisdictional discovery should conclude sooner than depositions relating to merits discovery. The parties should also be prepared to discuss a plan for taking depositions relating to the merits of the claims against the defendants who are currently in jurisdictional discovery in the event that those claims are not dismissed on jurisdictional grounds. Second, the parties should be prepared to discuss the number of fact depositions per side and whether the two sides should be allowed to take the same number of depositions (Paragraph 35). Furthermore, the parties should be prepared to discuss the reasoning behind the numbers they have proposed, including the specific witnesses they wish to depose and why they believe depositions of those witnesses are critical. At this time, the Court is inclined to permit 75 depositions for the plaintiffs; it is unclear whether a similar number for the defendants is necessary. Third, the parties should be prepared to discuss which depositions should be counted toward any imposed limit (Paragraph 38). At this time, the Court is inclined not to count de bene esse depositions but to count any discovery deposition of a witness whose testimony is subsequently taken for trial preservation. In addition, the defendants' proposal with respect to this paragraph refers to a party noticing "the deposition of its own witness." The defendants should be prepared to explain what this phrase means and how it is distinguishable from depositions to perpetuate testimony for trial. (Telephone Conference set for 1/24/2018 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/2/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ap)
December 28, 2017 Filing 35 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (3845 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Status Report filed by Wael Jalaidan. ENDORSEMENT: The Court deems this status report to be sufficient. Counsel is directed to continue his efforts to communicate directly and proactively with OFAC to pursue the approval of the necessary license. In light of the holiday schedule, the next status report shall be due on February 4, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 12/28/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(ap)
November 22, 2017 Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 11/22/2017 re: Adjourn Oral Argument as to Saudi Binladin Group, Al Rajhi Bank, and National Commercial Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
November 21, 2017 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Lawrence Boysen in Support re: (3628 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Islamic Republic of Iran.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kaplan, Robert)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (3794 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, et al.) ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED (Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 3667 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN: MOTION to Dismiss; 3670 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN: MOTION to Dismiss; et al. : Replies due by 1/4/2018.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/20/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(jwh)
November 17, 2017 Filing 31 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Michael K. Kellogg dated November 17, 2017 re: Request for Extension of Time To Submit Replies in Support of Motions To Dismiss. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kellogg, Michael)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: terminating 3486 (in case 3md1570) Motion for Attorney Fees; terminating 3727 (in case 3md1570) Letter Motion for Conference. As discussed at the conference held on October 5, 2017, the following deadlines have been modified. Defendant World Assembly of Muslim Youth's ("WAMY's") document production shall be completed by November 30, 2017. Because WAMY has been given substantial time to produce documents, no further extensions of this deadline will be granted. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees ("PECs") shall file a status letter discussing WAMY's document production and whether it intends to file any discovery motions by January 5, 2018. The PECs shall file any discovery motion against Defendant Yassin Abdullah Al Kadi no later than December 1, 2017, by motion not to exceed 20 double-spaced pages. Defendant Kadi shall oppose such motion no later than January 5, 2018, by memorandum of law not to exceed 20 double-spaced pages. The PECs may file a reply no later than January 26, 2018, by memorandum of law not to exceed 10 double-spaced pages. The PECs shall file any discovery motion against Defendants Muslim World League ("MWL") and International Islamic Relief Organization ("IIRO") no later than December 1, 2017, by motion not to exceed 20 double-spaced pages. Defendants MWL and IIRO shall oppose such discovery motion no later than January 5, 2018, by memorandum of law not to exceed 20 double-spaced pages. The PECs may file a reply no later than January 26, 2018, by memorandum of law not to exceed 10 double-spaced pages. All other deadlines remain in effect. In addition, in light of Defendant Perouz Sedaghaty's ongoing bankruptcy proceedings, Plaintiffs' application for attorney fees and expenses, ECF No. 3486, is DENIED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 3486 and 3727. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/12/2017) (ap) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ap) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: The Court previously scheduled a telephone conference for 4:00 p.m. on October 5, 2017, to address certain deadlines. During the conference, the Court will also address the Plaintiffs' Executive Committees' request to extend the deadlines to submit motions to compel or motions for sanctions against Defendants Muslim World League and the International Islamic Relief Organization. ECF No. 3737. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees are directed to circulate a call-in number to all interested parties and to provide that number to the Court in advance of the telephone conference. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/3/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(rj)
August 31, 2017 Filing 28 STATUS REPORT. Plaintiffs' Executive Committees' Status Report in accordance with the Court's July 28, 2017 Order Document filed by All Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
August 28, 2017 Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Robert T. Haefele on behalf of the PECs dated August 28, 2017 re: Disputes regarding proposed deposition protocol for the MDL. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
August 22, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (368 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 33 in 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN, 101 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN, 47 in 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN, 19 in 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN, 494 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 466 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN, 15 in 1:17-cv-05174-GBD, 46 in 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN, 418 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 29 in 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN, 221 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN, 768 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 449 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 556 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 565 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 39 in 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN, 981 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 9 in 1:17-cv-06123-GBD, 372 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 29 in 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN, 576 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN, 844 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 455 in 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 338 in 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM, 541 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 46 in 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN, 362 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 23 in 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN, 624 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 378 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN, 66 in 1:16-cv-07853-GBD, 26 in 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN, 36 in 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN, 3698 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 46 in 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN, 363 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 21 in 1:17-cv-05471-GBD, 39 in 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN) MOTION for Matthew S. Leddicotte to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14038631. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., (47 in 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN, 47 in 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN, 67 in 1:16-cv-07853-GBD, 47 in 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN, 37 in 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN, 24 in 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN, 40 in 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN, 3699 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 10 in 1:17-cv-06123-GBD) MOTION for Reuben J. Sequeira to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14039333. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(wb)
August 21, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION for Matthew S. Leddicotte to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14038631. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Al Rajhi Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Curran, Christopher)
August 7, 2017 Filing 25 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (366 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 554 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 539 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 840 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 492 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 574 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN, 766 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 370 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 622 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 376 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN, 3674 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 979 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 563 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD) Letter filed by Faisal Islamic Bank, Faisal Islamic Bank (Sudan), Faisal Islamic Bank-Sudan. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to remove John Lauro, Michael Califano, and Hugh Higgins from the electronic service list in all cases included in this multidistrict litigation. Attorney Hugh D Higgins and John F. Lauro terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/7/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(ap)
August 1, 2017 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Gregory G. Rapawy in Support re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 9/11 Commission Report (Part 1 of 3), #2 Exhibit 1 9/11 Commission Report (Part 2 of 3), #3 Exhibit 1 9/11 Commission Report (Part 3 of 3), #4 Exhibit 2 Terrorist Financing Monograph, #5 Exhibit 3 Staff Statement No. 16, #6 Exhibit 4 2005 FBI-CIA Summary, #7 Exhibit 5 9/11 Review Report, #8 Exhibit 6 Statement by the ODNI, #9 Exhibit 7 Plaintiffs First Set of Jurisdictional Requests for Production of Documents)(Kellogg, Michael)
August 1, 2017 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Kellogg, Michael)
August 1, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Kingdom of Saudi Arabia.(Kellogg, Michael)
August 1, 2017 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Roy T. Englert, Jr. in Support re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Al-Roshood Declaration), #2 Exhibit 1-13 (Al-Roshood Declaration), #3 Exhibit B (Declaration of Abdulaziz H. Al Fahad), #4 Exhibit C (6.24.03 Hearing Transcript in Burnett v. Al Baraka) (Part 1 of 2), #5 Exhibit C (6.24.03 Hearing Transcript in Burnett v. Al Baraka) (Part 2 of 2))(Robbins, Lawrence)
August 1, 2017 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. (Robbins, Lawrence)
August 1, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina.(Robbins, Lawrence)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER EXTENDING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION TO ALL CONSOLIDATED MDL CASES granting (758) Motion for Leave to Appear Extension of Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD; granting (3664) Motion for Leave to Appear Extension of Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (566) Motion for Leave to Appear Extension of Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; granting (531) Motion for Leave to Appear Extension of Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD; granting (555) Motion for Leave to Appear Extension of Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD; granting (835) Motion for Leave to Appear Extension of Pro Hac Vice in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; granting (33) Motion for Leave to Appear Extension of Pro Hac Vice in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; granting (32) Motion for Leave to Appear Extension of Pro Hac Vice in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; granting (32) Motion for Leave to Appear Extension of Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; granting (32) Motion for Leave to Appear Extension of Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; granting (20) Motion for Leave to Appear Extension of Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; granting (9) Motion for Leave to Appear Extension of Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; granting (25) Motion for Leave to Appear Extension of Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; granting (17) Motion for Leave to Appear Extension of Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; granting (10) Motion for Leave to Appear Extension of Pro Hac Vice in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD; granting (971) Motion for Leave to Appear Extension of Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN. The pro hac vice admissions of Roy T. Englert, Jr., of the law firm Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP, are extended to all cases consolidated into the above captioned multi-district litigation ("MDL") before this Court. Roy T. Englert, Jr. may appear on behalf of Saudi High Commission in the above captioned cases, or any other consolidated MDL cases, now or in the future, by filing notices of appearance. Additional applications for pro hac vice admission will not be required. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/31/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ap) Modified on 8/1/2017 (mro).
July 28, 2017 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Leave to Appear in Consolidated MDL Cases . Document filed by Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Pro Hac Vice Admission To All Consolidated MDL Cases)(Robbins, Lawrence) Modified on 9/14/2017 (ldi).
July 28, 2017 Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 3661 in 03-MD-1570 MOTION TO EXTEND PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION TO ALL CONSOLIDATED MDL CASES, AND NOTICES OF APPEARANCE. ENDORSEMENT: The Kingdom of Saudi Arabia's motion to extend the pro hac vice admission of Mark C. Hansen and to enter Notices of Appearance for Mark C. Hansen, Michael K. Kellogg, and Gregory G. Rapawy in all cases comprising this MDL is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter Notice of Appearances for the three attorneys referenced in this motion in all of the cases listed in the caption for the motion and terminate the corresponding motions. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/28/2017) (ap) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. Modified on 7/28/2017 (ap). Modified on 7/31/2017 (ap). Modified on 7/31/2017 (ap). Modified on 8/1/2017 (mro).
July 27, 2017 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Leave to Appear in Consolidated MDL Cases . Document filed by Kingdom of Saudi Arabia.(Kellogg, Michael) Modified on 9/14/2017 (ldi).
July 18, 2017 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Michael K. Kellogg dated July 18, 2017 re: Request for Additional Pages for Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Kingdom of Saudi Arabia.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kellogg, Michael)
July 13, 2017 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Document filed by Dennis Reilly, Luis Calle, Janina Frelas, Howard Perry, Anita Ferdinand, Janusz Marcinkowski, Tadeusz Kajda, Raymond Schnarr, Chiemene Jenkins, Isioma Ogbue, Arlene Reddick, Piotr Polak, Jose Morales Jr., Michelle Berti, Allen Charles Garner, Stephanie Campbell, Czeslaw Jagiello, Jerkeida R. Grant, Peter Giordano, Walter Villafuerte, Rafael Valdez, Richard Sammarco, Brian Kemp, Matthew Norton, Bryant Williamson, Doris Martinez, Daniel O'Brien, Joan M. Farrell, Linda Eaton-Lewis, John L. Kemp, Stanislaw S. Faltynowicz, Ramon Sola, Jose Siguachi, Richard Lennon, Mathew Cusumano, Neil Attardi, Mohamed Jalloh, Manuel Garcia, Charles Murphy, Milagros Figueroa, Ana Estrella, Nathan Bednarsh, Stanislaw Dziadezykowski, Joseph Racanelli, Thelmore Meeks, Angela Calhoun, Nicholas Moscato, Ernestine Branch, Kenrick Nisbett, James T. Keller, Maria Hernandez, Joseph M. Urso, Phillip McQueen, Piotr Majewski, Yvonne Salaman, Joseph Wimmer, Jozef Pogorzelski, Edward Lobue, Raymond Cassar, Jozef Sokolowski, Aldo Antonio, Stanislaw Burzynski, Angel Figueroa, James G. Service, Michelle Bracey, Jerry Morales, Michael Barrett, Howard Caplan, Joffre Salinas, Elzbieta Ciborowska, Rickie McKie, Eunicestine Rutledge, Stanislaw Kubrak, Gregory Voce, Deborah Lupard, Christopher Tangney, Ira Fogelgaren, Colombina Estrella, Martha Bermudez, Kevin F. Robinson, William Neary, Ryszard Gorecki, Ruth Hermosilla, Coretta Callender-Faulk, Arnaldo Almonte, Richard F. Bergmann, Candelaria Porras, Gabriel Pena, Mark Libecci, Thomas McMahon, Thomas Marucheau, Kirk Hohensheldt, Dr. Donald Valerino, Alfonza Green, Michael Browne, Todd Mayer, James J. Jenkins, Thomas Joseph Cera, Sorel LaFaurie, Susan Latham, Martha Sepulveda, Milton Gordon, Jacek Sieka, Arina Bakhareva, Cheryl Simpkins, Ramiro Ramirez, Debra Anne Monte, Louis Garcia, Felix Calle, Anthony Vangeli, Benjamin Rivers, Jorge Campoverde, Peter C. Zaun, John P. Gorea Jr., Joseph Fitzgerald, Anthony Hall, Sheila Boyette, Witold Roginski, Rose Harris, Juan Prada, Paul Thyberg, Jose Collado, Waldemar Kapkowski, Frank Gianni, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Albert McIntosh, Richard Barnett, Deveret M. Howell, Jose Emilio Gaviria, Stanislaw Pszeniczny, Leonard Desilva, Robert Fitzpatrick, Maria Encarnacion, Mieczyslaw Smoderek, Michael Thomas McPhillips, Paul Tacconi, Miguel Nolasco, William Fallon, Iliana Troya, Vanessa Pero, Denis Dooley, Rosa Siguencia, John Patino, Lena Fabian-Slim, Marianne Leto, Zdzislaw Langier, John H. Lavelle, Michael McPhillips, John J. Dalton, Robert McAllister, William Mulzet, Kathy Gibbs, Jerzy Czypinisz, Dariusz Bienduga, Odessa Chin, Fernando Baracaldo, Joseph Savoca, Richard Trotta, Diovani Gutierrez, Benjamin Jones, Anibal Rodriguez, Julio C. Lliguicota, James Doran, Donna DeSoto, Maria Perez-Delgado, Andrew M. Santeramo, Dominick M. Montalto Jr., Juan Carlos Roa, Juan Carlos Pena, Maria Fernanda Garcia, Marva M. White, Pamela Gallichio, Melinda Figueroa, Laurie Edwards, Carlos L. Herrera, Volodymyr Khomik, James B. Troncoso Jr., Errol Wynter, Clay Calle, Wanda I. Ortiz, Linus Korieocha, Enoel Torres, Edward Groger, Rafael A. Velasco, Franciszek Chojnowski, Jose Luis Bello, Jadwiga Galazka, Nubia Ramirez, Delicia Gary, Patrick Okeefe, Thomas McHugh, Rance Louallen, Walter Silverman, John Dobies, Thomas Miraglia, Sharon Jacobs, Sylvia Schmitz, Marlene Monteleone, Carmen Marte, Esteban Bueno, Dolores Suarez, Ernest K. Matthews, Maritza Liriano, Julie Harvey, Ramiro Rodriguez, Herminio Tapanes, Jozef Filipkowski, Joseph P. Giamportone, Anthony Santa Maria, Mario Valenzuela, Yuriy Bilonozhenko, Maxine Londner, Peter Seeman, Karen Eremita, Diane Lewis, Jerzy Kadziela, Pascual Llibri, Liana Velasquez, Tadeusz Kowalewski, Joanne Felicetta, Lorenzo Pittman, Boguslaw Dlugosz, Richard Kiggins, Maria Puello, Oscar Perez, Stephen M. Dietz, Sonja Checinski, Valeriy Lavruk, Richard Filippazzo, George Kaperonis, Tokeato Carter, John Odia, Marian A. Lizzio, Patricia Workman, Blanche Alejandro, Yudelka Collado, Adrian Pierce, Mark Sly, Claudia S. Bernstein, Samuel Kahan, Kenneth L. Murray, Alex Daikoku, Guillermo Torres, Matthew Henderson, Priscilla Payne, Hector Castro, Victor Solis, Eugeniusz Jastrzebowski, Diana C. Matthews, Alexander Gorelik, Joseph Polidoro, Joseph Montwaid, Kevin McPartland, Ramdial Sookhai, David Sharinn, Patrick Colossi, Michael Cioffi, Gerard Ciquera, Vincent Fiorenza, Robert Mandell, Michael Hunt, George Lamoreaux, Ann Grant, Robert Perniciaro, Robert Schnelle, Josefina Rosado, Carmen Mena, Greg McDonald, Terence J. Smith, Lily Trofimoff, Jose Llaverias, William R. Mendez, Janusz Piersa, Laura Whickum, Nicolas Loaiza, Andrzej Lasica, Ignacy Rozanski, Raymond Pose, James Sheehan, Minerva Rivera, Virginia Ortiz, Luis Martinez-Nicolas, Aleksander Bajguz, Gisel Castro, Jean-Anne Mackrell, Curtis Crowe, Jerimiah Jamison, Ralph Salomone, Frank Gorglione, Wladyslaw Barszcz, Gersham Williams, Zbigniew Czachurski, Dallas Cromwell, Emanuel R. Weisgras, Royal Eversley, Mark Roseman, Robert Dinnen, Robert E. McFeeley, Joseph Maddaloni, Alexis Monroe, Barbara Singleton, Aluko Mose, Israel Gil, Albert Talker, James E. McCullough, Zygmunt Kwiatkowski, Trevor Berridge, Jan Pomichowski, Germano Riviera, Barry Stevens, Jan Bachusz, Stanley Becton, Robert Conti, Richard Baker, William Dolan, Alonso Espinoza, Suvarna Shah, Dioselina Quintana, Zbigniew Kucharski, Jeffrey Kegler, Stanislaw Radzieta, Clara Montague, Hernan Alvarez, Gustavo Iturralde, Jose Sobral, Jerzy Muszkatel, Paul Stutz, Barbara Demarco, Jorge Espinoza, Guillermo Osorio, Jose Naranjo, Rose Wells, Enrico Frase, Kimete Velic, Wynelle Welch, Luis B. Garcia, Joseph Lewis, Tadeusz Pajerski, Charles DeMarco, Ireneusz Mierzejewski, Sonia M. Capon, Sergiu Dumitrache, Daniel Mackey, Andrejz Nerc, Noel Velez, Demetrius Samadjopoulos, Gloria Llanes, Debbie Morales, Waldemar Directie, Frank Degirolamo, Joseph Chierchio, William Myerwold, Joseph McDonald, Surjit Saini, Walter R. O'Donnell, Stewart Wilkins, Robert A. Burmeister, Lawrence Pearson, Tadeusz Milek, Juan Suarez, Carlos Cardenas, Juan B. Peralta, Christopher Uszynski, Maria Marino, Wojciech Michalik, Jonathan W. Socha, Alex Anthony Sanchez, Veronica Vasquez-Salinas, Jose A. Batista, Marian Retelski, Fred J. Krines, Teresa Morrone, Jose A. Rivera, Barry Aissatou, Howard Kosta, Thomas F. King, Henry Lozano, Mark S. Kelly, Elizabeth A. Miller, Thomas Harden, David Whalen, Manuel Checo, George Pope Solomon, Thomas Galligan, Ryan McGinty, Frances Benjamin, Leverne Floyd, Emeka Nwigwe, Iris Ramirez, William Schmitt, Gustavo Blandon, Ramona Ramirez, Yvonne Robinson, Barbara Boursiquot, Ronalda Nicholas-Frazier, Rosa Medina, Michael Mulvaney, Mark Gado, Americo Rodriguez, Igor J. Makar, William Parker, Raymond Morales, Lili Packer, Steven Ruggiero, Zbigniew Mankiewicz, Dennis Cassidy, Carlos Raul Gomez, Esperanza Munoz, Teresa Jurado, Brion Stewart, Hernan Munoz, Jozef Madej, David Levy, Kathleen Donavon, Kristin McGrath, Muriel Cunningham, Fain McKinney, Derek L. Partee, Raul Martinez Sr., Joseph Russo, Jennifer A. Jacovino, Susan Lawrence, Peter McGrath, Joseph A. Cella, Leszek Bieniek, Wandalesca Espinal, Amy Krakow, Maria Fajardo, Erwin Kirbach, Vincent Sarcone, Allan Grier, Ryszard Obiedzinski, Shedricka Nesbitt, Keith Kaplan, Quentin Kirkland, Francisco Cordova, Galo Cordova, William Lutter, Robert Park Borchert, Linda Suwidji, Gerald Colon, Cindy Cheung, Jan Dobrowolski, Mark Groblewski, Richard C. Williams, Vladimir Akoulov, Alexander Macias, Antonia Rivera, Joyce Keller, Deborah Washington, Rosaria J. Heide, Gag Gordova, Gregory Thomas, Teodulo Fiesta, Peter A. Gargano, George Echebiri, Jozef Galazka, Susana Martinez, Omar Ulffe, Jose A. Manrique, Marcin Grabowski, Milagros Fernandez, Jan Niedziela, Utjok Zaidan, Robert Kabakoff, Michael Oliva, Orlando Hernandez, Simone Gallo, Donna A. Fontana, Rosa Nunez, Heather Browne-Dee, Jan Kozinski, Juan Rakela, Ruben Santos, David Kogan, Frank Taylor, Robert S. Chapman, Geraldo Martinez, Robert N. Schroh, Peter Donahue, Arlene Ramery, Louis Duclerc, Alexander Landi, Castrenze DiCarlo, Neville Chung, Gary Iorio, Thomas Maloney, Marian Maksimiuk, Daniel Rodgers, Daniel Venditti, George Gaffney, Robbill Mohammed, Jeffrey Scott Seide, Julio Mayorga, Manuel Puli, Jozef Czubat, Christine Clausi Petosa, David B. Sontz, Margaret Nasta, John Toledo, Jose Dumet, Scott Wetter, Minerva Toro, Rhoda Berger, John Mescall, William Schuchat, Patrick Crowley, Antoni Lelek, Sonia Varela, Romuald Cieslak, Julio Repetto, Nelson Marty, Mark Gendel, Lucyna Foremska, Francisco Mite, Gerome Cerverizzo, Oneil Parkes, Timothy Sullivan, German Sanchez, Vasilios Parthenis, Gwendolyn Brandt, Lee Perlman, Robert Sienkiewicz, William J. Moise Jr., Volodymyr Lyseyko, Mary Ellen Hurd-Shy, Edgar Munoz, Rudolph Dyer, James Carriel, Henryk Ciborowski, Jaroslaw Ludwiczak, Jozef Z. Kruczak, Peter C. Maguire Jr., Jagjewan Ramroop, Alan Brown, Rosemary Rodriguez, William Otto Koladzyn, Ed Nigri, Erika Espinosa, Russell Millar, Dariusz Chojnowski, Miguel Chung, Nilda Torres, Heather Cabrera, Michael Bartone, Miroslaw Binko, Manuel Foranoce, Doretha Middleton, Felix Santana, Michael Pignatelli, Piotr Matuszewski, Jason B. Lowenfeld, Frank Ventimiglia, Rosa Diaz Alvarez, Jeffrey Bernstein, Jacqueline Morrison, Miller M. Parra, Telma Alvarado, Stanislaw Karpierz, Robert Serrone, Edwin Vargas, Dragica Roy, John Hickman, Darryl Lee, Mozella Gatewood, Halina Tapia, Tommy Mendez, Barry Bryan, Michal Brodacki, Frances LaPointe, James Donohue, Tadeusz Larwa, Yvette Griffins, Patrick Hansen, Michael Hafey, Joseph Benbow, John Napolitano, Karen Reoch, Curtis Charles Mondesir, George L. Velez, Minerva Tross, Pawel Stepniewicz, Maria Chainoha, Joseph Belmonte, Phillip R. Bryant, John Jarvis, Luz Stella Lopez, Eugene Gentile, Rose E. Gribben, Leonardo Cano, Maritza Colon, Rabiah Gaynor, Gennadiy Barykin, Henryk Grabowski, Richard Delfino, Jose Santos Vaca, Sam Roseman, Mark Rothman, Hopeton Malcolm, Richard J. Pearse, Mark Clarke-Milton, William I. Ramirezy, Wilmer Andrade, Dara Simon, Paul Brobeck, Barbara Minsky, Howard Abrams, Rosa Espinoza
June 20, 2017 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. (kl)
June 19, 2017 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia ; Saudi High Commission For Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Howard Abrams, Tony Agyman, Barry Aissatou, Vladimir Akoulov, Blanche Alejandro, Arnaldo Almonte, Telma Alvarado, Hernan Alvarez, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Wilmer Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Neil Attardi, Jan Bachusz, Andrzej Badzio, Aleksander Bajguz, Richard Baker, Arina Bakhareva, Fernando Baracaldo, Richard Barnett, Michael Barrett, Wladyslaw Barszcz, Michael Bartone, Gennadiy Barykin, Jose A. Batista, Stanley Becton, Nathan Bednarsh, Jose Luis Bello, Joseph Belmonte, Joseph Benbow, Frances Benjamin, Rhoda Berger, Richard F. Bergmann, Martha Bermudez, Claudia S. Bernstein, Jeffrey Bernstein, Trevor Berridge, Michelle Berti, Dariusz Bienduga, Leszek Bieniek, Yuriy Bilonozhenko, Miroslaw Binko, John Bitsko, Gustavo Blandon, Robert Park Borchert, Barbara Boursiquot, Sheila Boyette, Michelle Bracey, Ernestine Branch, Gwendolyn Brandt, Paul Brobeck, Michal Brodacki, Alan Brown, Michael Browne, Heather Browne-Dee, Barry Bryan, Phillip R. Bryant, Esteban Bueno, Robert A. Burmeister, Stanislaw Burzynski, Heather Cabrera, Angela Calhoun, Clay Calle, Felix Calle, Luis Calle, Coretta Callender-Faulk, Ana Camacho, Stephanie Campbell, Jorge Campoverde, Leonardo Cano, Carrie Cantey, Howard Caplan, Sonia M. Capon, Carlos Cardenas, James Carriel, Tokeato Carter, Raymond Cassar, Dennis Cassidy, Gisel Castro, Hector Castro, Joseph A. Cella, Thomas Joseph Cera, Gerome Cerverizzo, Maria Chainoha, Robert S. Chapman, Sonja Checinski, Manuel Checo, Cindy Cheung, Joseph Chierchio, Odessa Chin, Dariusz Chojnowski, Franciszek Chojnowski, Miguel Chung, Neville Chung, Elzbieta Ciborowska, Henryk Ciborowski, Romuald Cieslak, Michael Cioffi, Gerard Ciquera, Mark Clarke-Milton, Jose Collado, Yudelka Collado, Gerald Colon, Maritza Colon, Patrick Colossi, Robert Conti, Francisco Cordova, Galo Cordova, Dallas Cromwell, Curtis Crowe, Patrick Crowley, Muriel Cunningham, Mathew Cusumano, Zbigniew Czachurski, Jozef Czubat, Jerzy Czypinisz, Alex Daikoku, John J. Dalton, Charles DeMarco, Donna DeSoto, Frank Degirolamo, Richard Delfino, Barbara Demarco, Leonard Desilva, Castrenze DiCarlo, Rosa Diaz Alvarez, Stephen M. Dietz, Robert Dinnen, Waldemar Directie, Boguslaw Dlugosz, John Dobies, Jan Dobrowolski, William Dolan, Peter Donahue, Kathleen Donavon, James Donohue, Denis Dooley, James Doran, Louis Duclerc, Jose Dumet, Sergiu Dumitrache, Rudolph Dyer, Stanislaw Dziadezykowski, Linda Eaton-Lewis, George Echebiri, Laurie Edwards, Maria Encarnacion, Karen Eremita, Wandalesca Espinal, Erika Espinosa, Alonso Espinoza, Jorge Espinoza, Rosa Espinoza, Ana Estrella, Colombina Estrella, Royal Eversley, Lena Fabian-Slim, Maria Fajardo, William Fallon, Stanislaw S. Faltynowicz, Joan M. Farrell, Joanne Felicetta, Anita Ferdinand, Maria Fernanda Garcia, Milagros Fernandez, Stanislaw Fic, Teodulo Fiesta, Angel Figueroa, Melinda Figueroa, Milagros Figueroa, Jozef Filipkowski, Richard Filippazzo, Vincent Fiorenza, Joseph Fitzgerald, Robert Fitzpatrick, Leverne Floyd, Ira Fogelgaren, Donna A. Fontana, Manuel Foranoce, Lucyna Foremska, Enrico Frase, Janina Frelas, Mark Gado, George Gaffney, Jadwiga Galazka, Jozef Galazka, Pamela Gallichio, Thomas Galligan, Simone Gallo, Louis Garcia, Luis B. Garcia, Manuel Garcia, Peter A. Gargano, Allen Charles Garner, Delicia Gary, Mozella Gatewood, Jose Emilio Gaviria, Rabiah Gaynor, Mark Gendel, Eugene Gentile, Joseph P. Giamportone, Frank Gianni, Kathy Gibbs, Israel Gil, Peter Giordano, Carlos Raul Gomez, Milton Gordon, Gag Gordova, John P. Gorea Jr., Ryszard Gorecki, Alexander Gorelik, Frank Gorglione, Henryk Grabowski, Marcin Grabowski, Ann Grant, Jerkeida R. Grant, Alfonza Green, Rose E. Gribben, Allan Grier, Yvette Griffins, Mark Groblewski, Edward Groger, Diovani Gutierrez, Michael Hafey, Anthony Hall, Patrick Hansen, Thomas Harden, Rose Harris, Julie Harvey, Rosaria J. Heide, Matthew Henderson, Ruth Hermosilla, Maria Hernandez, Orlando Hernandez, Carlos L. Herrera, John Hickman, Kirk Hohensheldt, Deveret M. Howell, Michael Hunt, Mary Ellen Hurd-Shy, Gary Iorio, Gustavo Iturralde, Sharon Jacobs, Jennifer A. Jacovino, Czeslaw Jagiello, Mohamed Jalloh, Jerimiah Jamison, John Jarvis, Eugeniusz Jastrzebowski, Chiemene Jenkins, James J. Jenkins, Benjamin Jones, Teresa Jurado, Robert Kabakoff, Jerzy Kadziela, Samuel Kahan, Tadeusz Kajda, George Kaperonis, Waldemar Kapkowski, Keith Kaplan, Stanislaw Karpierz, Jeffrey Kegler, James T. Keller, Joyce Keller, Mark S. Kelly, Brian Kemp, John L. Kemp, Volodymyr Khomik, Richard Kiggins, Thomas F. King, Erwin Kirbach, Quentin Kirkland, David Kogan, William Otto Koladzyn, Linus Korieocha, Howard Kosta, Tadeusz Kowalewski, Jan Kozinski, Amy Krakow, Fred J. Krines, Jozef Z. Kruczak, Stanislaw Kubrak, Zbigniew Kucharski, Marian Kuczaj, Zygmunt Kwiatkowski, Sorel LaFaurie, Frances LaPointe, George Lamoreaux, Alexander Landi, Zdzislaw Langier, Tadeusz Larwa, Andrzej Lasica, Susan Latham, John H. Lavelle, Valeriy Lavruk, Susan Lawrence, Darryl Lee, Antoni Lelek, Richard Lennon, Marianne Leto, David Levy, Diane Lewis, Joseph Lewis, Mark Libecci, Maritza Liriano, Marian A. Lizzio, Gloria Llanes, Jose Llaverias, Pascual Llibri, Julio C. Lliguicota, Nicolas Loaiza, Edward Lobue, Maxine Londner, Luz Stella Lopez, Rance Louallen, Jason B. Lowenfeld, Henry Lozano, Jaroslaw Ludwiczak, Deborah Lupard, William Lutter, Volodymyr Lyseyko, Alexander Macias, Daniel Mackey, Jean-Anne Mackrell, Joseph Maddaloni, Jozef Madej, Peter C. Maguire Jr., Piotr Majewski, Igor J. Makar, Marian Maksimiuk, Hopeton Malcolm, Thomas Maloney, Robert Mandell, Zbigniew Mankiewicz, Jose A. Manrique, Janusz Marcinkowski, Maria Marino, Carmen Marte, Doris Martinez, Geraldo Martinez, Susana Martinez, Raul Martinez Sr., Luis Martinez-Nicolas, Nelson Marty, Thomas Marucheau, Diana C. Matthews, Ernest K. Matthews, Piotr Matuszewski, Todd Mayer, Julio Mayorga, Robert McAllister, James E. McCullough, Greg McDonald, Joseph McDonald, Robert E. McFeeley, Ryan McGinty, Kristin McGrath, Peter McGrath, Thomas McHugh, Albert McIntosh, Rickie McKie, Fain McKinney, Thomas McMahon, Kevin McPartland, Michael McPhillips, Michael Thomas McPhillips, Phillip McQueen, Rosa Medina, Thelmore Meeks, Carmen Mena, Tommy Mendez, William R. Mendez, John Mescall, Wojciech Michalik, Doretha Middleton, Ireneusz Mierzejewski, Tadeusz Milek, Russell Millar, Elizabeth A. Miller, Barbara Minsky, Thomas Miraglia, Francisco Mite, Robbill Mohammed, William J. Moise Jr., Curtis Charles Mondesir, Alexis Monroe, Clara Montague, Dominick M. Montalto Jr., Nino Montano, Debra Anne Monte, Marlene Monteleone, Joseph Montwaid, Debbie Morales, Jerry Morales, Raymond Morales, Jose Morales Jr., Jacqueline Morrison, Teresa Morrone, Nicholas Moscato, Aluko Mose, Michael Mulvaney, William Mulzet, Edgar Munoz, Esperanza Munoz, Hernan Munoz, Charles Murphy, Kenneth L. Murray, Jerzy Muszkatel, William Myerwold, John Napolitano, Jose Naranjo, Margaret Nasta, William Neary, Andrejz Nerc, Shedricka Nesbitt, Ronalda Nicholas-Frazier, Jan Niedziela, Ed Nigri, Kenrick Nisbett, Miguel Nolasco, Matthew Norton, Rosa Nunez, Emeka Nwigwe, Daniel O'Brien, Walter R. O'Donnell, Ryszard Obiedzinski, John Odia, Isioma Ogbue, Patrick Okeefe, Michael Oliva, Virginia Ortiz, Wanda I. Ortiz, Guillermo Osorio, Lili Packer, Tadeusz Pajerski, William Parker, Oneil Parkes, Miller M. Parra, Derek L. Partee, Vasilios Parthenis, John Patino, Priscilla Payne, Richard J. Pearse, Lawrence Pearson, Gabriel Pena, Juan Carlos Pena, Juan B. Peralta, Oscar Perez, Maria Perez-Delgado, Lee Perlman, Robert Perniciaro, Vanessa Pero, Howard Perry, Christine Clausi Petosa, Adrian Pierce, Janusz Piersa, Michael Pignatelli, Lorenzo Pittman, Jozef Pogorzelski, Piotr Polak, Joseph Polidoro, Jan Pomichowski, Candelaria Porras, Raymond Pose, Juan Prada, Stanislaw Pszeniczny, Maria Puello, Manuel Puli, Dioselina Quintana, Joseph Racanelli, Stanislaw Radzieta, Juan Rakela, Arlene Ramery, Iris Ramirez, Nubia Ramirez, Ramiro Ramirez, Ramona Ramirez, William I. Ramirezy, Jagjewan Ramroop, Arlene Reddick, Dennis Reilly, Karen Reoch, Julio Repetto, Marian Retelski, Antonia Rivera, Jose A. Rivera, Minerva Rivera, Benjamin Rivers, Germano Riviera, Juan Carlos Roa, Kevin F. Robinson, Yvonne Robinson, Daniel Rodgers, Americo Rodriguez, Anibal Rodriguez, Ramiro Rodriguez, Rosemary Rodriguez, Witold Roginski, Josefina Rosado, Mark Roseman, Sam Roseman, Mark Rothman, Dragica Roy, Ignacy Rozanski, Steven Ruggiero, Joseph Russo, Eunicestine Rutledge, Surjit Saini, Yvonne Salaman, Joffre Salinas, Ralph Salomone, Demetrius Samadjopoulos, Richard Sammarco, Alex Anthony Sanchez, German Sanchez, Anthony Santa Maria, Felix Santana, Andrew M. Santeramo, Ruben Santos, Vincent Sarcone, Joseph Savoca, William Schmitt, Sylvia Schmitz, Raymond Schnarr, Robert Schnelle, Robert N. Schroh, William Schuchat, Peter Seeman, Jeffrey Scott Seide, Martha Sepulveda, Robert Serrone, James G. Service, Suvarna Shah, David Sharinn, James Sheehan, Jacek Sieka, Robert Sienkiewicz, Jose Siguachi, Rosa Siguencia, Walter Silverman, Dara Simon, Cheryl Simpkins, Barbara Singleton, Mark Sly, Terence J. Smith, Mieczyslaw Smoderek, Jose Sobral, Jonathan W. Socha, Jozef Sokolowski, Ramon Sola, Victor Solis, George Pope Solomon, David B. Sontz, Ramdial Sookhai, Pawel Stepniewicz, Barry Stevens, Brion Stewart, Paul Stutz, Dolores Suarez, Juan Suarez, Timothy Sullivan, Linda Suwidji, Paul Tacconi, Albert Talker, Christopher Tangney, Herminio Tapanes, Halina Tapia, Frank Taylor, Gregory Thomas, Paul Thyberg, John Toledo, Minerva Toro, Enoel Torres, Guillermo Torres, Nilda Torres, Lily Trofimoff, James B. Troncoso Jr., Minerva Tross, Richard Trotta, Iliana Troya, Omar Ulffe, Joseph M. Urso, Christopher Uszynski, Jose Santos Vaca, Rafael Valdez, Mario Valenzuela, Dr. Donald Valerino, Anthony Vangeli, Sonia Varela, Edwin Vargas, Veronica Vasquez-Salinas, Rafael A. Velasco, Liana Velasquez, George L. Velez, Noel Velez, Kimete Velic, Daniel Venditti, Frank Ventimiglia, Walter Villafuerte, Gregory Voce, Deborah Washington, Emanuel R. Weisgras, Wynelle Welch, Rose Wells, Scott
June 16, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): THE WRONG CASE NUMBER IS LISTED ON THE SUMMONS REQUEST. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (kl)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) and General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions and settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/14/2017) (ama) Modified on 6/27/2017 (ama).
June 14, 2017 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
June 14, 2017 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. (jc)
June 14, 2017 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
June 14, 2017 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
June 12, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert Allen Grochow on behalf of Howard Abrams, Tony Agyman, Barry Aissatou, Vladimir Akoulov, Blanche Alejandro, Arnaldo Almonte, Telma Alvarado, Hernan Alvarez, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Wilmer Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Neil Attardi, Jan Bachusz, Andrzej Badzio, Aleksander Bajguz, Richard Baker, Arina Bakhareva, Fernando Baracaldo, Richard Barnett, Michael Barrett, Wladyslaw Barszcz, Michael Bartone, Gennadiy Barykin, Jose A. Batista, Stanley Becton, Nathan Bednarsh, Jose Luis Bello, Joseph Belmonte, Joseph Benbow, Frances Benjamin, Rhoda Berger, Richard F. Bergmann, Martha Bermudez, Claudia S. Bernstein, Jeffrey Bernstein, Trevor Berridge, Michelle Berti, Dariusz Bienduga, Leszek Bieniek, Yuriy Bilonozhenko, Miroslaw Binko, John Bitsko, Gustavo Blandon, Robert Park Borchert, Barbara Boursiquot, Sheila Boyette, Michelle Bracey, Ernestine Branch, Gwendolyn Brandt, Paul Brobeck, Michal Brodacki, Alan Brown, Michael Browne, Heather Browne-Dee, Barry Bryan, Phillip R. Bryant, Esteban Bueno, Robert A. Burmeister, Stanislaw Burzynski, Heather Cabrera, Angela Calhoun, Clay Calle, Felix Calle, Luis Calle, Coretta Callender-Faulk, Ana Camacho, Stephanie Campbell, Jorge Campoverde, Leonardo Cano, Carrie Cantey, Howard Caplan, Sonia M. Capon, Carlos Cardenas, James Carriel, Tokeato Carter, Raymond Cassar, Dennis Cassidy, Gisel Castro, Hector Castro, Joseph A. Cella, Thomas Joseph Cera, Gerome Cerverizzo, Maria Chainoha, Robert S. Chapman, Sonja Checinski, Manuel Checo, Cindy Cheung, Joseph Chierchio, Odessa Chin, Dariusz Chojnowski, Franciszek Chojnowski, Miguel Chung, Neville Chung, Elzbieta Ciborowska, Henryk Ciborowski, Romuald Cieslak, Michael Cioffi, Gerard Ciquera, Mark Clarke-Milton, Jose Collado, Yudelka Collado, Gerald Colon, Maritza Colon, Patrick Colossi, Robert Conti, Francisco Cordova, Galo Cordova, Dallas Cromwell, Curtis Crowe, Patrick Crowley, Muriel Cunningham, Mathew Cusumano, Zbigniew Czachurski, Jozef Czubat, Jerzy Czypinisz, Alex Daikoku, John J. Dalton, Charles DeMarco, Donna DeSoto, Frank Degirolamo, Richard Delfino, Barbara Demarco, Leonard Desilva, Castrenze DiCarlo, Rosa Diaz Alvarez, Stephen M. Dietz, Robert Dinnen, Waldemar Directie, Boguslaw Dlugosz, John Dobies, Jan Dobrowolski, William Dolan, Peter Donahue, Kathleen Donavon, James Donohue, Denis Dooley, James Doran, Louis Duclerc, Jose Dumet, Sergiu Dumitrache, Rudolph Dyer, Stanislaw Dziadezykowski, Linda Eaton-Lewis, George Echebiri, Laurie Edwards, Maria Encarnacion, Karen Eremita, Wandalesca Espinal, Erika Espinosa, Alonso Espinoza, Jorge Espinoza, Rosa Espinoza, Ana Estrella, Colombina Estrella, Royal Eversley, Lena Fabian-Slim, Maria Fajardo, William Fallon, Stanislaw S. Faltynowicz, Joan M. Farrell, Joanne Felicetta, Anita Ferdinand, Maria Fernanda Garcia, Milagros Fernandez, Stanislaw Fic, Teodulo Fiesta, Angel Figueroa, Melinda Figueroa, Milagros Figueroa, Jozef Filipkowski, Richard Filippazzo, Vincent Fiorenza, Joseph Fitzgerald, Robert Fitzpatrick, Leverne Floyd, Ira Fogelgaren, Donna A. Fontana, Manuel Foranoce, Lucyna Foremska, Enrico Frase, Janina Frelas, Mark Gado, George Gaffney, Jadwiga Galazka, Jozef Galazka, Pamela Gallichio, Thomas Galligan, Simone Gallo, Louis Garcia, Luis B. Garcia, Manuel Garcia, Peter A. Gargano, Allen Charles Garner, Delicia Gary, Mozella Gatewood, Jose Emilio Gaviria, Rabiah Gaynor, Mark Gendel, Eugene Gentile, Joseph P. Giamportone, Frank Gianni, Kathy Gibbs, Israel Gil, Peter Giordano, Carlos Raul Gomez, Milton Gordon, Gag Gordova, John P. Gorea Jr., Ryszard Gorecki, Alexander Gorelik, Frank Gorglione, Henryk Grabowski, Marcin Grabowski, Ann Grant, Jerkeida R. Grant, Alfonza Green, Rose E. Gribben, Allan Grier, Yvette Griffins, Mark Groblewski, Edward Groger, Diovani Gutierrez, Michael Hafey, Anthony Hall, Patrick Hansen, Thomas Harden, Rose Harris, Julie Harvey, Rosaria J. Heide, Matthew Henderson, Ruth Hermosilla, Maria Hernandez, Orlando Hernandez, Carlos L. Herrera, John Hickman, Kirk Hohensheldt, Deveret M. Howell, Michael Hunt, Mary Ellen Hurd-Shy, Gary Iorio, Gustavo Iturralde, Sharon Jacobs, Jennifer A. Jacovino, Czeslaw Jagiello, Mohamed Jalloh, Jerimiah Jamison, John Jarvis, Eugeniusz Jastrzebowski, Chiemene Jenkins, James J. Jenkins, Benjamin Jones, Teresa Jurado, Robert Kabakoff, Jerzy Kadziela, Samuel Kahan, Tadeusz Kajda, George Kaperonis, Waldemar Kapkowski, Keith Kaplan, Stanislaw Karpierz, Jeffrey Kegler, James T. Keller, Joyce Keller, Mark S. Kelly, Brian Kemp, John L. Kemp, Volodymyr Khomik, Richard Kiggins, Thomas F. King, Erwin Kirbach, Quentin Kirkland, David Kogan, William Otto Koladzyn, Linus Korieocha, Howard Kosta, Tadeusz Kowalewski, Jan Kozinski, Amy Krakow, Fred J. Krines, Jozef Z. Kruczak, Stanislaw Kubrak, Zbigniew Kucharski, Marian Kuczaj, Zygmunt Kwiatkowski, Sorel LaFaurie, Frances LaPointe, George Lamoreaux, Alexander Landi, Zdzislaw Langier, Tadeusz Larwa, Andrzej Lasica, Susan Latham, John H. Lavelle, Valeriy Lavruk, Susan Lawrence, Darryl Lee, Antoni Lelek, Richard Lennon, Marianne Leto, David Levy, Diane Lewis, Joseph Lewis, Mark Libecci, Maritza Liriano, Marian A. Lizzio, Gloria Llanes, Jose Llaverias, Pascual Llibri, Julio C. Lliguicota, Nicolas Loaiza, Edward Lobue, Maxine Londner, Luz Stella Lopez, Rance Louallen, Jason B. Lowenfeld, Henry Lozano, Jaroslaw Ludwiczak, Deborah Lupard, William Lutter, Volodymyr Lyseyko, Alexander Macias, Daniel Mackey, Jean-Anne Mackrell, Joseph Maddaloni, Jozef Madej, Peter C. Maguire Jr., Piotr Majewski, Igor J. Makar, Marian Maksimiuk, Hopeton Malcolm, Thomas Maloney, Robert Mandell, Zbigniew Mankiewicz, Jose A. Manrique, Janusz Marcinkowski, Maria Marino, Carmen Marte, Doris Martinez, Geraldo Martinez, Susana Martinez, Raul Martinez Sr., Luis Martinez-Nicolas, Nelson Marty, Thomas Marucheau, Diana C. Matthews, Ernest K. Matthews, Piotr Matuszewski, Todd Mayer, Julio Mayorga, Robert McAllister, James E. McCullough, Greg McDonald, Joseph McDonald, Robert E. McFeeley, Ryan McGinty, Kristin McGrath, Peter McGrath, Thomas McHugh, Albert McIntosh, Rickie McKie, Fain McKinney, Thomas McMahon, Kevin McPartland, Michael McPhillips, Michael Thomas McPhillips, Phillip McQueen, Rosa Medina, Thelmore Meeks, Carmen Mena, Tommy Mendez, William R. Mendez, John Mescall, Wojciech Michalik, Doretha Middleton, Ireneusz Mierzejewski, Tadeusz Milek, Russell Millar, Elizabeth A. Miller, Barbara Minsky, Thomas Miraglia, Francisco Mite, Robbill Mohammed, William J. Moise Jr., Curtis Charles Mondesir, Alexis Monroe, Clara Montague, Dominick M. Montalto Jr., Nino Montano, Debra Anne Monte, Marlene Monteleone, Joseph Montwaid, Debbie Morales, Jerry Morales, Raymond Morales, Jose Morales Jr., Jacqueline Morrison, Teresa Morrone, Nicholas Moscato, Aluko Mose, Michael Mulvaney, William Mulzet, Edgar Munoz, Esperanza Munoz, Hernan Munoz, Charles Murphy, Kenneth L. Murray, Jerzy Muszkatel, William Myerwold, John Napolitano, Jose Naranjo, Margaret Nasta, William Neary, Andrejz Nerc, Shedricka Nesbitt, Ronalda Nicholas-Frazier, Jan Niedziela, Ed Nigri, Kenrick Nisbett, Miguel Nolasco, Matthew Norton, Rosa Nunez, Emeka Nwigwe, Daniel O'Brien, Walter R. O'Donnell, Ryszard Obiedzinski, John Odia, Isioma Ogbue, Patrick Okeefe, Michael Oliva, Virginia Ortiz, Wanda I. Ortiz, Guillermo Osorio, Lili Packer, Tadeusz Pajerski, William Parker, Oneil Parkes, Miller M. Parra, Derek L. Partee, Vasilios Parthenis, John Patino, Priscilla Payne, Richard J. Pearse, Lawrence Pearson, Gabriel Pena, Juan Carlos Pena, Juan B. Peralta, Oscar Perez, Maria Perez-Delgado, Lee Perlman, Robert Perniciaro, Vanessa Pero, Howard Perry, Christine Clausi Petosa, Adrian Pierce, Janusz Piersa, Michael Pignatelli, Lorenzo Pittman, Jozef Pogorzelski, Piotr Polak, Joseph Polidoro, Jan Pomichowski, Candelaria Porras, Raymond Pose, Juan Prada, Stanislaw Pszeniczny, Maria Puello, Manuel Puli, Dioselina Quintana, Joseph Racanelli, Stanislaw Radzieta, Juan Rakela, Arlene Ramery, Iris Ramirez, Nubia Ramirez, Ramiro Ramirez, Ramona Ramirez, William I. Ramirezy, Jagjewan Ramroop, Arlene Reddick, Dennis Reilly, Karen Reoch, Julio Repetto, Marian Retelski, Antonia Rivera, Jose A. Rivera, Minerva Rivera, Benjamin Rivers, Germano Riviera, Juan Carlos Roa, Kevin F. Robinson, Yvonne Robinson, Daniel Rodgers, Americo Rodriguez, Anibal Rodriguez, Ramiro Rodriguez, Rosemary Rodriguez, Witold Roginski, Josefina Rosado, Mark Roseman, Sam Roseman, Mark Rothman, Dragica Roy, Ignacy Rozanski, Steven Ruggiero, Joseph Russo, Eunicestine Rutledge, Surjit Saini, Yvonne Salaman, Joffre Salinas, Ralph Salomone, Demetrius Samadjopoulos, Richard Sammarco, Alex Anthony Sanchez, German Sanchez, Anthony Santa Maria, Felix Santana, Andrew M. Santeramo, Ruben Santos, Vincent Sarcone, Joseph Savoca, William Schmitt, Sylvia Schmitz, Raymond Schnarr, Robert Schnelle, Robert N. Schroh, William Schuchat, Peter Seeman, Jeffrey Scott Seide, Martha Sepulveda, Robert Serrone, James G. Service, Suvarna Shah, David Sharinn, James Sheehan, Jacek Sieka, Robert Sienkiewicz, Jose Siguachi, Rosa Siguencia, Walter Silverman, Dara Simon, Cheryl Simpkins, Barbara Singleton, Mark Sly, Terence J. Smith, Mieczyslaw Smoderek, Jose Sobral, Jonathan W. Socha, Jozef Sokolowski, Ramon Sola, Victor Solis, George Pope Solomon, David B. Sontz, Ramdial Sookhai, Pawel Stepniewicz, Barry Stevens, Brion Stewart, Paul Stutz, Dolores Suarez, Juan Suarez, Timothy Sullivan, Linda Suwidji, Paul Tacconi, Albert Talker, Christopher Tangney, Herminio Tapanes, Halina Tapia, Frank Taylor, Gregory Thomas, Paul Thyberg, John Toledo, Minerva Toro, Enoel Torres, Guillermo Torres, Nilda Torres, Lily Trofimoff, James B. Troncoso Jr., Minerva Tross, Richard Trotta, Iliana Troya, Omar Ulffe, Joseph M. Urso, Christopher Uszynski, Jose Santos Vaca, Rafael Valdez, Mario Valenzuela, Dr. Donald Valerino, Anthony Vangeli, Sonia Varela, Edwin Vargas, Veronica Vasquez-Salinas, Rafael A. Velasco, Liana Velasquez, George L. Velez, Noel Velez, Kimete Velic, Daniel Venditti, Frank Ventimiglia, Walter Villafuerte, Gregory Voce, Deborah Washington, Emanuel R. Weisgras, Wynelle Welch, Rose Wells, Scott Wetter, David Whalen, Laura Whickum, Marva M. White, Stewart Wilkins, Gersham Williams, Richar
June 9, 2017 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Robert A. Grochow dated 06092017 re: Request for Case to be Related to Master MDL. Document filed by Howard Abrams, Tony Agyman, Barry Aissatou, Vladimir Akoulov, Blanche Alejandro, Arnaldo Almonte, Telma Alvarado, Hernan Alvarez, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Wilmer Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Neil Attardi, Jan Bachusz, Andrzej Badzio, Aleksander Bajguz, Richard Baker, Arina Bakhareva, Fernando Baracaldo, Richard Barnett, Michael Barrett, Wladyslaw Barszcz, Michael Bartone, Gennadiy Barykin, Jose A. Batista, Stanley Becton, Nathan Bednarsh, Jose Luis Bello, Joseph Belmonte, Joseph Benbow, Frances Benjamin, Rhoda Berger, Richard F. Bergmann, Martha Bermudez, Claudia S. Bernstein, Jeffrey Bernstein, Trevor Berridge, Michelle Berti, Dariusz Bienduga, Leszek Bieniek, Yuriy Bilonozhenko, Miroslaw Binko, John Bitsko, Gustavo Blandon, Robert Park Borchert, Barbara Boursiquot, Sheila Boyette, Michelle Bracey, Ernestine Branch, Gwendolyn Brandt, Paul Brobeck, Michal Brodacki, Alan Brown, Michael Browne, Heather Browne-Dee, Barry Bryan, Phillip R. Bryant, Esteban Bueno, Robert A. Burmeister, Stanislaw Burzynski, Heather Cabrera, Angela Calhoun, Clay Calle, Felix Calle, Luis Calle, Coretta Callender-Faulk, Ana Camacho, Stephanie Campbell, Jorge Campoverde, Leonardo Cano, Carrie Cantey, Howard Caplan, Sonia M. Capon, Carlos Cardenas, James Carriel, Tokeato Carter, Raymond Cassar, Dennis Cassidy, Gisel Castro, Hector Castro, Joseph A. Cella, Thomas Joseph Cera, Gerome Cerverizzo, Maria Chainoha, Robert S. Chapman, Sonja Checinski, Manuel Checo, Cindy Cheung, Joseph Chierchio, Odessa Chin, Dariusz Chojnowski, Franciszek Chojnowski, Miguel Chung, Neville Chung, Elzbieta Ciborowska, Henryk Ciborowski, Romuald Cieslak, Michael Cioffi, Gerard Ciquera, Mark Clarke-Milton, Jose Collado, Yudelka Collado, Gerald Colon, Maritza Colon, Patrick Colossi, Robert Conti, Francisco Cordova, Galo Cordova, Dallas Cromwell, Curtis Crowe, Patrick Crowley, Muriel Cunningham, Mathew Cusumano, Zbigniew Czachurski, Jozef Czubat, Jerzy Czypinisz, Alex Daikoku, John J. Dalton, Charles DeMarco, Donna DeSoto, Frank Degirolamo, Richard Delfino, Barbara Demarco, Leonard Desilva, Castrenze DiCarlo, Rosa Diaz Alvarez, Stephen M. Dietz, Robert Dinnen, Waldemar Directie, Boguslaw Dlugosz, John Dobies, Jan Dobrowolski, William Dolan, Peter Donahue, Kathleen Donavon, James Donohue, Denis Dooley, James Doran, Louis Duclerc, Jose Dumet, Sergiu Dumitrache, Rudolph Dyer, Stanislaw Dziadezykowski, Linda Eaton-Lewis, George Echebiri, Laurie Edwards, Maria Encarnacion, Karen Eremita, Wandalesca Espinal, Erika Espinosa, Alonso Espinoza, Jorge Espinoza, Rosa Espinoza, Ana Estrella, Colombina Estrella, Royal Eversley, Lena Fabian-Slim, Maria Fajardo, William Fallon, Stanislaw S. Faltynowicz, Joan M. Farrell, Joanne Felicetta, Anita Ferdinand, Maria Fernanda Garcia, Milagros Fernandez, Stanislaw Fic, Teodulo Fiesta, Angel Figueroa, Melinda Figueroa, Milagros Figueroa, Jozef Filipkowski, Richard Filippazzo, Vincent Fiorenza, Joseph Fitzgerald, Robert Fitzpatrick, Leverne Floyd, Ira Fogelgaren, Donna A. Fontana, Manuel Foranoce, Lucyna Foremska, Enrico Frase, Janina Frelas, Mark Gado, George Gaffney, Jadwiga Galazka, Jozef Galazka, Pamela Gallichio, Thomas Galligan, Simone Gallo, Louis Garcia, Luis B. Garcia, Manuel Garcia, Peter A. Gargano, Allen Charles Garner, Delicia Gary, Mozella Gatewood, Jose Emilio Gaviria, Rabiah Gaynor, Mark Gendel, Eugene Gentile, Joseph P. Giamportone, Frank Gianni, Kathy Gibbs, Israel Gil, Peter Giordano, Carlos Raul Gomez, Milton Gordon, Gag Gordova, John P. Gorea Jr., Ryszard Gorecki, Alexander Gorelik, Frank Gorglione, Henryk Grabowski, Marcin Grabowski, Ann Grant, Jerkeida R. Grant, Alfonza Green, Rose E. Gribben, Allan Grier, Yvette Griffins, Mark Groblewski, Edward Groger, Diovani Gutierrez, Michael Hafey, Anthony Hall, Patrick Hansen, Thomas Harden, Rose Harris, Julie Harvey, Rosaria J. Heide, Matthew Henderson, Ruth Hermosilla, Maria Hernandez, Orlando Hernandez, Carlos L. Herrera, John Hickman, Kirk Hohensheldt, Deveret M. Howell, Michael Hunt, Mary Ellen Hurd-Shy, Gary Iorio, Gustavo Iturralde, Sharon Jacobs, Jennifer A. Jacovino, Czeslaw Jagiello, Mohamed Jalloh, Jerimiah Jamison, John Jarvis, Eugeniusz Jastrzebowski, Chiemene Jenkins, James J. Jenkins, Benjamin Jones, Teresa Jurado, Robert Kabakoff, Jerzy Kadziela, Samuel Kahan, Tadeusz Kajda, George Kaperonis, Waldemar Kapkowski, Keith Kaplan, Stanislaw Karpierz, Jeffrey Kegler, James T. Keller, Joyce Keller, Mark S. Kelly, Brian Kemp, John L. Kemp, Volodymyr Khomik, Richard Kiggins, Thomas F. King, Erwin Kirbach, Quentin Kirkland, David Kogan, William Otto Koladzyn, Linus Korieocha, Howard Kosta, Tadeusz Kowalewski, Jan Kozinski, Amy Krakow, Fred J. Krines, Jozef Z. Kruczak, Stanislaw Kubrak, Zbigniew Kucharski, Marian Kuczaj, Zygmunt Kwiatkowski, Sorel LaFaurie, Frances LaPointe, George Lamoreaux, Alexander Landi, Zdzislaw Langier, Tadeusz Larwa, Andrzej Lasica, Susan Latham, John H. Lavelle, Valeriy Lavruk, Susan Lawrence, Darryl Lee, Antoni Lelek, Richard Lennon, Marianne Leto, David Levy, Diane Lewis, Joseph Lewis, Mark Libecci, Maritza Liriano, Marian A. Lizzio, Gloria Llanes, Jose Llaverias, Pascual Llibri, Julio C. Lliguicota, Nicolas Loaiza, Edward Lobue, Maxine Londner, Luz Stella Lopez, Rance Louallen, Jason B. Lowenfeld, Henry Lozano, Jaroslaw Ludwiczak, Deborah Lupard, William Lutter, Volodymyr Lyseyko, Alexander Macias, Daniel Mackey, Jean-Anne Mackrell, Joseph Maddaloni, Jozef Madej, Peter C. Maguire Jr., Piotr Majewski, Igor J. Makar, Marian Maksimiuk, Hopeton Malcolm, Thomas Maloney, Robert Mandell, Zbigniew Mankiewicz, Jose A. Manrique, Janusz Marcinkowski, Maria Marino, Carmen Marte, Doris Martinez, Geraldo Martinez, Susana Martinez, Raul Martinez Sr., Luis Martinez-Nicolas, Nelson Marty, Thomas Marucheau, Diana C. Matthews, Ernest K. Matthews, Piotr Matuszewski, Todd Mayer, Julio Mayorga, Robert McAllister, James E. McCullough, Greg McDonald, Joseph McDonald, Robert E. McFeeley, Ryan McGinty, Kristin McGrath, Peter McGrath, Thomas McHugh, Albert McIntosh, Rickie McKie, Fain McKinney, Thomas McMahon, Kevin McPartland, Michael McPhillips, Michael Thomas McPhillips, Phillip McQueen, Rosa Medina, Thelmore Meeks, Carmen Mena, Tommy Mendez, William R. Mendez, John Mescall, Wojciech Michalik, Doretha Middleton, Ireneusz Mierzejewski, Tadeusz Milek, Russell Millar, Elizabeth A. Miller, Barbara Minsky, Thomas Miraglia, Francisco Mite, Robbill Mohammed, William J. Moise Jr., Curtis Charles Mondesir, Alexis Monroe, Clara Montague, Dominick M. Montalto Jr., Nino Montano, Debra Anne Monte, Marlene Monteleone, Joseph Montwaid, Debbie Morales, Jerry Morales, Raymond Morales, Jose Morales Jr., Jacqueline Morrison, Teresa Morrone, Nicholas Moscato, Aluko Mose, Michael Mulvaney, William Mulzet, Edgar Munoz, Esperanza Munoz, Hernan Munoz, Charles Murphy, Kenneth L. Murray, Jerzy Muszkatel, William Myerwold, John Napolitano, Jose Naranjo, Margaret Nasta, William Neary, Andrejz Nerc, Shedricka Nesbitt, Ronalda Nicholas-Frazier, Jan Niedziela, Ed Nigri, Kenrick Nisbett, Miguel Nolasco, Matthew Norton, Rosa Nunez, Emeka Nwigwe, Daniel O'Brien, Walter R. O'Donnell, Ryszard Obiedzinski, John Odia, Isioma Ogbue, Patrick Okeefe, Michael Oliva, Virginia Ortiz, Wanda I. Ortiz, Guillermo Osorio, Lili Packer, Tadeusz Pajerski, William Parker, Oneil Parkes, Miller M. Parra, Derek L. Partee, Vasilios Parthenis, John Patino, Priscilla Payne, Richard J. Pearse, Lawrence Pearson, Gabriel Pena, Juan Carlos Pena, Juan B. Peralta, Oscar Perez, Maria Perez-Delgado, Lee Perlman, Robert Perniciaro, Vanessa Pero, Howard Perry, Christine Clausi Petosa, Adrian Pierce, Janusz Piersa, Michael Pignatelli, Lorenzo Pittman, Jozef Pogorzelski, Piotr Polak, Joseph Polidoro, Jan Pomichowski, Candelaria Porras, Raymond Pose, Juan Prada, Stanislaw Pszeniczny, Maria Puello, Manuel Puli, Dioselina Quintana, Joseph Racanelli, Stanislaw Radzieta, Juan Rakela, Arlene Ramery, Iris Ramirez, Nubia Ramirez, Ramiro Ramirez, Ramona Ramirez, William I. Ramirezy, Jagjewan Ramroop, Arlene Reddick, Dennis Reilly, Karen Reoch, Julio Repetto, Marian Retelski, Antonia Rivera, Jose A. Rivera, Minerva Rivera, Benjamin Rivers, Germano Riviera, Juan Carlos Roa, Kevin F. Robinson, Yvonne Robinson, Daniel Rodgers, Americo Rodriguez, Anibal Rodriguez, Ramiro Rodriguez, Rosemary Rodriguez, Witold Roginski, Josefina Rosado, Mark Roseman, Sam Roseman, Mark Rothman, Dragica Roy, Ignacy Rozanski, Steven Ruggiero, Joseph Russo, Eunicestine Rutledge, Surjit Saini, Yvonne Salaman, Joffre Salinas, Ralph Salomone, Demetrius Samadjopoulos, Richard Sammarco, Alex Anthony Sanchez, German Sanchez, Anthony Santa Maria, Felix Santana, Andrew M. Santeramo, Ruben Santos, Vincent Sarcone, Joseph Savoca, William Schmitt, Sylvia Schmitz, Raymond Schnarr, Robert Schnelle, Robert N. Schroh, William Schuchat, Peter Seeman, Jeffrey Scott Seide, Martha Sepulveda, Robert Serrone, James G. Service, Suvarna Shah, David Sharinn, James Sheehan, Jacek Sieka, Robert Sienkiewicz, Jose Siguachi, Rosa Siguencia, Walter Silverman, Dara Simon, Cheryl Simpkins, Barbara Singleton, Mark Sly, Terence J. Smith, Mieczyslaw Smoderek, Jose Sobral, Jonathan W. Socha, Jozef Sokolowski, Ramon Sola, Victor Solis, George Pope Solomon, David B. Sontz, Ramdial Sookhai, Pawel Stepniewicz, Barry Stevens, Brion Stewart, Paul Stutz, Dolores Suarez, Juan Suarez, Timothy Sullivan, Linda Suwidji, Paul Tacconi, Albert Talker, Christopher Tangney, Herminio Tapanes, Halina Tapia, Frank Taylor, Gregory Thomas, Paul Thyberg, John Toledo, Minerva Toro, Enoel Torres, Guillermo Torres, Nilda Torres, Lily Trofimoff, James B. Troncoso Jr., Minerva Tross, Richard Trotta, Iliana Troya, Omar Ulffe, Joseph M. Urso, Christopher Uszynski, Jose Santos Vaca, Rafael Valdez, Mario Valenzuela, Dr. Donald Valerino, Anthony Vangeli, Sonia Varela, Edwin Vargas, Veronica Vasquez-Salinas, Rafael A. Velasco, Liana Velasquez, George L. Velez, Noel Velez, Kimete Velic, Daniel Venditti, Frank Ventimiglia, Walter Villafuerte, Gregory Voce, Deborah Washington, Emanuel R. Weisgras, Wynelle Welch, Rose Wells, Scott We
June 9, 2017 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Robert A. Grochow dated 06092017 re: Request for Case to be Related to Master MDL. Document filed by Howard Abrams, Tony Agyman, Barry Aissatou, Vladimir Akoulov, Blanche Alejandro, Arnaldo Almonte, Telma Alvarado, Hernan Alvarez, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Wilmer Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Neil Attardi, Jan Bachusz, Andrzej Badzio, Aleksander Bajguz, Richard Baker, Arina Bakhareva, Fernando Baracaldo, Richard Barnett, Michael Barrett, Wladyslaw Barszcz, Michael Bartone, Gennadiy Barykin, Jose A. Batista, Stanley Becton, Nathan Bednarsh, Jose Luis Bello, Joseph Belmonte, Joseph Benbow, Frances Benjamin, Rhoda Berger, Richard F. Bergmann, Martha Bermudez, Claudia S. Bernstein, Jeffrey Bernstein, Trevor Berridge, Michelle Berti, Dariusz Bienduga, Leszek Bieniek, Yuriy Bilonozhenko, Miroslaw Binko, John Bitsko, Gustavo Blandon, Robert Park Borchert, Barbara Boursiquot, Sheila Boyette, Michelle Bracey, Ernestine Branch, Gwendolyn Brandt, Paul Brobeck, Michal Brodacki, Alan Brown, Michael Browne, Heather Browne-Dee, Barry Bryan, Phillip R. Bryant, Esteban Bueno, Robert A. Burmeister, Stanislaw Burzynski, Heather Cabrera, Angela Calhoun, Clay Calle, Felix Calle, Luis Calle, Coretta Callender-Faulk, Ana Camacho, Stephanie Campbell, Jorge Campoverde, Leonardo Cano, Carrie Cantey, Howard Caplan, Sonia M. Capon, Carlos Cardenas, James Carriel, Tokeato Carter, Raymond Cassar, Dennis Cassidy, Gisel Castro, Hector Castro, Joseph A. Cella, Thomas Joseph Cera, Gerome Cerverizzo, Maria Chainoha, Robert S. Chapman, Sonja Checinski, Manuel Checo, Cindy Cheung, Joseph Chierchio, Odessa Chin, Dariusz Chojnowski, Franciszek Chojnowski, Miguel Chung, Neville Chung, Elzbieta Ciborowska, Henryk Ciborowski, Romuald Cieslak, Michael Cioffi, Gerard Ciquera, Mark Clarke-Milton, Jose Collado, Yudelka Collado, Gerald Colon, Maritza Colon, Patrick Colossi, Robert Conti, Francisco Cordova, Galo Cordova, Dallas Cromwell, Curtis Crowe, Patrick Crowley, Muriel Cunningham, Mathew Cusumano, Zbigniew Czachurski, Jozef Czubat, Jerzy Czypinisz, Alex Daikoku, John J. Dalton, Charles DeMarco, Donna DeSoto, Frank Degirolamo, Richard Delfino, Barbara Demarco, Leonard Desilva, Castrenze DiCarlo, Rosa Diaz Alvarez, Stephen M. Dietz, Robert Dinnen, Waldemar Directie, Boguslaw Dlugosz, John Dobies, Jan Dobrowolski, William Dolan, Peter Donahue, Kathleen Donavon, James Donohue, Denis Dooley, James Doran, Louis Duclerc, Jose Dumet, Sergiu Dumitrache, Rudolph Dyer, Stanislaw Dziadezykowski, Linda Eaton-Lewis, George Echebiri, Laurie Edwards, Maria Encarnacion, Karen Eremita, Wandalesca Espinal, Erika Espinosa, Alonso Espinoza, Jorge Espinoza, Rosa Espinoza, Ana Estrella, Colombina Estrella, Royal Eversley, Lena Fabian-Slim, Maria Fajardo, William Fallon, Stanislaw S. Faltynowicz, Joan M. Farrell, Joanne Felicetta, Anita Ferdinand, Maria Fernanda Garcia, Milagros Fernandez, Stanislaw Fic, Teodulo Fiesta, Angel Figueroa, Melinda Figueroa, Milagros Figueroa, Jozef Filipkowski, Richard Filippazzo, Vincent Fiorenza, Joseph Fitzgerald, Robert Fitzpatrick, Leverne Floyd, Ira Fogelgaren, Donna A. Fontana, Manuel Foranoce, Lucyna Foremska, Enrico Frase, Janina Frelas, Mark Gado, George Gaffney, Jadwiga Galazka, Jozef Galazka, Pamela Gallichio, Thomas Galligan, Simone Gallo, Louis Garcia, Luis B. Garcia, Manuel Garcia, Peter A. Gargano, Allen Charles Garner, Delicia Gary, Mozella Gatewood, Jose Emilio Gaviria, Rabiah Gaynor, Mark Gendel, Eugene Gentile, Joseph P. Giamportone, Frank Gianni, Kathy Gibbs, Israel Gil, Peter Giordano, Carlos Raul Gomez, Milton Gordon, Gag Gordova, John P. Gorea Jr., Ryszard Gorecki, Alexander Gorelik, Frank Gorglione, Henryk Grabowski, Marcin Grabowski, Ann Grant, Jerkeida R. Grant, Alfonza Green, Rose E. Gribben, Allan Grier, Yvette Griffins, Mark Groblewski, Edward Groger, Diovani Gutierrez, Michael Hafey, Anthony Hall, Patrick Hansen, Thomas Harden, Rose Harris, Julie Harvey, Rosaria J. Heide, Matthew Henderson, Ruth Hermosilla, Maria Hernandez, Orlando Hernandez, Carlos L. Herrera, John Hickman, Kirk Hohensheldt, Deveret M. Howell, Michael Hunt, Mary Ellen Hurd-Shy, Gary Iorio, Gustavo Iturralde, Sharon Jacobs, Jennifer A. Jacovino, Czeslaw Jagiello, Mohamed Jalloh, Jerimiah Jamison, John Jarvis, Eugeniusz Jastrzebowski, Chiemene Jenkins, James J. Jenkins, Benjamin Jones, Teresa Jurado, Robert Kabakoff, Jerzy Kadziela, Samuel Kahan, Tadeusz Kajda, George Kaperonis, Waldemar Kapkowski, Keith Kaplan, Stanislaw Karpierz, Jeffrey Kegler, James T. Keller, Joyce Keller, Mark S. Kelly, Brian Kemp, John L. Kemp, Volodymyr Khomik, Richard Kiggins, Thomas F. King, Erwin Kirbach, Quentin Kirkland, David Kogan, William Otto Koladzyn, Linus Korieocha, Howard Kosta, Tadeusz Kowalewski, Jan Kozinski, Amy Krakow, Fred J. Krines, Jozef Z. Kruczak, Stanislaw Kubrak, Zbigniew Kucharski, Marian Kuczaj, Zygmunt Kwiatkowski, Sorel LaFaurie, Frances LaPointe, George Lamoreaux, Alexander Landi, Zdzislaw Langier, Tadeusz Larwa, Andrzej Lasica, Susan Latham, John H. Lavelle, Valeriy Lavruk, Susan Lawrence, Darryl Lee, Antoni Lelek, Richard Lennon, Marianne Leto, David Levy, Diane Lewis, Joseph Lewis, Mark Libecci, Maritza Liriano, Marian A. Lizzio, Gloria Llanes, Jose Llaverias, Pascual Llibri, Julio C. Lliguicota, Nicolas Loaiza, Edward Lobue, Maxine Londner, Luz Stella Lopez, Rance Louallen, Jason B. Lowenfeld, Henry Lozano, Jaroslaw Ludwiczak, Deborah Lupard, William Lutter, Volodymyr Lyseyko, Alexander Macias, Daniel Mackey, Jean-Anne Mackrell, Joseph Maddaloni, Jozef Madej, Peter C. Maguire Jr., Piotr Majewski, Igor J. Makar, Marian Maksimiuk, Hopeton Malcolm, Thomas Maloney, Robert Mandell, Zbigniew Mankiewicz, Jose A. Manrique, Janusz Marcinkowski, Maria Marino, Carmen Marte, Doris Martinez, Geraldo Martinez, Susana Martinez, Raul Martinez Sr., Luis Martinez-Nicolas, Nelson Marty, Thomas Marucheau, Diana C. Matthews, Ernest K. Matthews, Piotr Matuszewski, Todd Mayer, Julio Mayorga, Robert McAllister, James E. McCullough, Greg McDonald, Joseph McDonald, Robert E. McFeeley, Ryan McGinty, Kristin McGrath, Peter McGrath, Thomas McHugh, Albert McIntosh, Rickie McKie, Fain McKinney, Thomas McMahon, Kevin McPartland, Michael McPhillips, Michael Thomas McPhillips, Phillip McQueen, Rosa Medina, Thelmore Meeks, Carmen Mena, Tommy Mendez, William R. Mendez, John Mescall, Wojciech Michalik, Doretha Middleton, Ireneusz Mierzejewski, Tadeusz Milek, Russell Millar, Elizabeth A. Miller, Barbara Minsky, Thomas Miraglia, Francisco Mite, Robbill Mohammed, William J. Moise Jr., Curtis Charles Mondesir, Alexis Monroe, Clara Montague, Dominick M. Montalto Jr., Nino Montano, Debra Anne Monte, Marlene Monteleone, Joseph Montwaid, Debbie Morales, Jerry Morales, Raymond Morales, Jose Morales Jr., Jacqueline Morrison, Teresa Morrone, Nicholas Moscato, Aluko Mose, Michael Mulvaney, William Mulzet, Edgar Munoz, Esperanza Munoz, Hernan Munoz, Charles Murphy, Kenneth L. Murray, Jerzy Muszkatel, William Myerwold, John Napolitano, Jose Naranjo, Margaret Nasta, William Neary, Andrejz Nerc, Shedricka Nesbitt, Ronalda Nicholas-Frazier, Jan Niedziela, Ed Nigri, Kenrick Nisbett, Miguel Nolasco, Matthew Norton, Rosa Nunez, Emeka Nwigwe, Daniel O'Brien, Walter R. O'Donnell, Ryszard Obiedzinski, John Odia, Isioma Ogbue, Patrick Okeefe, Michael Oliva, Virginia Ortiz, Wanda I. Ortiz, Guillermo Osorio, Lili Packer, Tadeusz Pajerski, William Parker, Oneil Parkes, Miller M. Parra, Derek L. Partee, Vasilios Parthenis, John Patino, Priscilla Payne, Richard J. Pearse, Lawrence Pearson, Gabriel Pena, Juan Carlos Pena, Juan B. Peralta, Oscar Perez, Maria Perez-Delgado, Lee Perlman, Robert Perniciaro, Vanessa Pero, Howard Perry, Christine Clausi Petosa, Adrian Pierce, Janusz Piersa, Michael Pignatelli, Lorenzo Pittman, Jozef Pogorzelski, Piotr Polak, Joseph Polidoro, Jan Pomichowski, Candelaria Porras, Raymond Pose, Juan Prada, Stanislaw Pszeniczny, Maria Puello, Manuel Puli, Dioselina Quintana, Joseph Racanelli, Stanislaw Radzieta, Juan Rakela, Arlene Ramery, Iris Ramirez, Nubia Ramirez, Ramiro Ramirez, Ramona Ramirez, William I. Ramirezy, Jagjewan Ramroop, Arlene Reddick, Dennis Reilly, Karen Reoch, Julio Repetto, Marian Retelski, Antonia Rivera, Jose A. Rivera, Minerva Rivera, Benjamin Rivers, Germano Riviera, Juan Carlos Roa, Kevin F. Robinson, Yvonne Robinson, Daniel Rodgers, Americo Rodriguez, Anibal Rodriguez, Ramiro Rodriguez, Rosemary Rodriguez, Witold Roginski, Josefina Rosado, Mark Roseman, Sam Roseman, Mark Rothman, Dragica Roy, Ignacy Rozanski, Steven Ruggiero, Joseph Russo, Eunicestine Rutledge, Surjit Saini, Yvonne Salaman, Joffre Salinas, Ralph Salomone, Demetrius Samadjopoulos, Richard Sammarco, Alex Anthony Sanchez, German Sanchez, Anthony Santa Maria, Felix Santana, Andrew M. Santeramo, Ruben Santos, Vincent Sarcone, Joseph Savoca, William Schmitt, Sylvia Schmitz, Raymond Schnarr, Robert Schnelle, Robert N. Schroh, William Schuchat, Peter Seeman, Jeffrey Scott Seide, Martha Sepulveda, Robert Serrone, James G. Service, Suvarna Shah, David Sharinn, James Sheehan, Jacek Sieka, Robert Sienkiewicz, Jose Siguachi, Rosa Siguencia, Walter Silverman, Dara Simon, Cheryl Simpkins, Barbara Singleton, Mark Sly, Terence J. Smith, Mieczyslaw Smoderek, Jose Sobral, Jonathan W. Socha, Jozef Sokolowski, Ramon Sola, Victor Solis, George Pope Solomon, David B. Sontz, Ramdial Sookhai, Pawel Stepniewicz, Barry Stevens, Brion Stewart, Paul Stutz, Dolores Suarez, Juan Suarez, Timothy Sullivan, Linda Suwidji, Paul Tacconi, Albert Talker, Christopher Tangney, Herminio Tapanes, Halina Tapia, Frank Taylor, Gregory Thomas, Paul Thyberg, John Toledo, Minerva Toro, Enoel Torres, Guillermo Torres, Nilda Torres, Lily Trofimoff, James B. Troncoso Jr., Minerva Tross, Richard Trotta, Iliana Troya, Omar Ulffe, Joseph M. Urso, Christopher Uszynski, Jose Santos Vaca, Rafael Valdez, Mario Valenzuela, Dr. Donald Valerino, Anthony Vangeli, Sonia Varela, Edwin Vargas, Veronica Vasquez-Salinas, Rafael A. Velasco, Liana Velasquez, George L. Velez, Noel Velez, Kimete Velic, Daniel Venditti, Frank Ventimiglia, Walter Villafuerte, Gregory Voce, Deborah Washington, Emanuel R. Weisgras, Wynelle Welch, Rose Wells, Scott Wetter, D
June 9, 2017 Filing 6 RELATED CASE AFFIDAVIT of Robert A. Grochow re: that this action be filed as related to 03 MDL 1570 (GBD) (SN). Document filed by Howard Abrams, Tony Agyman, Barry Aissatou, Vladimir Akoulov, Blanche Alejandro, Arnaldo Almonte, Telma Alvarado, Hernan Alvarez, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Wilmer Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Neil Attardi, Jan Bachusz, Andrzej Badzio, Aleksander Bajguz, Richard Baker, Arina Bakhareva, Fernando Baracaldo, Richard Barnett, Michael Barrett, Wladyslaw Barszcz, Michael Bartone, Gennadiy Barykin, Jose A. Batista, Stanley Becton, Nathan Bednarsh, Jose Luis Bello, Joseph Belmonte, Joseph Benbow, Frances Benjamin, Rhoda Berger, Richard F. Bergmann, Martha Bermudez, Claudia S. Bernstein, Jeffrey Bernstein, Trevor Berridge, Michelle Berti, Dariusz Bienduga, Leszek Bieniek, Yuriy Bilonozhenko, Miroslaw Binko, John Bitsko, Gustavo Blandon, Robert Park Borchert, Barbara Boursiquot, Sheila Boyette, Michelle Bracey, Ernestine Branch, Gwendolyn Brandt, Paul Brobeck, Michal Brodacki, Alan Brown, Michael Browne, Heather Browne-Dee, Barry Bryan, Phillip R. Bryant, Esteban Bueno, Robert A. Burmeister, Stanislaw Burzynski, Heather Cabrera, Angela Calhoun, Clay Calle, Felix Calle, Luis Calle, Coretta Callender-Faulk, Ana Camacho, Stephanie Campbell, Jorge Campoverde, Leonardo Cano, Carrie Cantey, Howard Caplan, Sonia M. Capon, Carlos Cardenas, James Carriel, Tokeato Carter, Raymond Cassar, Dennis Cassidy, Gisel Castro, Hector Castro, Joseph A. Cella, Thomas Joseph Cera, Gerome Cerverizzo, Maria Chainoha, Robert S. Chapman, Sonja Checinski, Manuel Checo, Cindy Cheung, Joseph Chierchio, Odessa Chin, Dariusz Chojnowski, Franciszek Chojnowski, Miguel Chung, Neville Chung, Elzbieta Ciborowska, Henryk Ciborowski, Romuald Cieslak, Michael Cioffi, Gerard Ciquera, Mark Clarke-Milton, Jose Collado, Yudelka Collado, Gerald Colon, Maritza Colon, Patrick Colossi, Robert Conti, Francisco Cordova, Galo Cordova, Dallas Cromwell, Curtis Crowe, Patrick Crowley, Muriel Cunningham, Mathew Cusumano, Zbigniew Czachurski, Jozef Czubat, Jerzy Czypinisz, Alex Daikoku, John J. Dalton, Charles DeMarco, Donna DeSoto, Frank Degirolamo, Richard Delfino, Barbara Demarco, Leonard Desilva, Castrenze DiCarlo, Rosa Diaz Alvarez, Stephen M. Dietz, Robert Dinnen, Waldemar Directie, Boguslaw Dlugosz, John Dobies, Jan Dobrowolski, William Dolan, Peter Donahue, Kathleen Donavon, James Donohue, Denis Dooley, James Doran, Louis Duclerc, Jose Dumet, Sergiu Dumitrache, Rudolph Dyer, Stanislaw Dziadezykowski, Linda Eaton-Lewis, George Echebiri, Laurie Edwards, Maria Encarnacion, Karen Eremita, Wandalesca Espinal, Erika Espinosa, Alonso Espinoza, Jorge Espinoza, Rosa Espinoza, Ana Estrella, Colombina Estrella, Royal Eversley, Lena Fabian-Slim, Maria Fajardo, William Fallon, Stanislaw S. Faltynowicz, Joan M. Farrell, Joanne Felicetta, Anita Ferdinand, Maria Fernanda Garcia, Milagros Fernandez, Stanislaw Fic, Teodulo Fiesta, Angel Figueroa, Melinda Figueroa, Milagros Figueroa, Jozef Filipkowski, Richard Filippazzo, Vincent Fiorenza, Joseph Fitzgerald, Robert Fitzpatrick, Leverne Floyd, Ira Fogelgaren, Donna A. Fontana, Manuel Foranoce, Lucyna Foremska, Enrico Frase, Janina Frelas, Mark Gado, George Gaffney, Jadwiga Galazka, Jozef Galazka, Pamela Gallichio, Thomas Galligan, Simone Gallo, Louis Garcia, Luis B. Garcia, Manuel Garcia, Peter A. Gargano, Allen Charles Garner, Delicia Gary, Mozella Gatewood, Jose Emilio Gaviria, Rabiah Gaynor, Mark Gendel, Eugene Gentile, Joseph P. Giamportone, Frank Gianni, Kathy Gibbs, Israel Gil, Peter Giordano, Carlos Raul Gomez, Milton Gordon, Gag Gordova, John P. Gorea Jr., Ryszard Gorecki, Alexander Gorelik, Frank Gorglione, Henryk Grabowski, Marcin Grabowski, Ann Grant, Jerkeida R. Grant, Alfonza Green, Rose E. Gribben, Allan Grier, Yvette Griffins, Mark Groblewski, Edward Groger, Diovani Gutierrez, Michael Hafey, Anthony Hall, Patrick Hansen, Thomas Harden, Rose Harris, Julie Harvey, Rosaria J. Heide, Matthew Henderson, Ruth Hermosilla, Maria Hernandez, Orlando Hernandez, Carlos L. Herrera, John Hickman, Kirk Hohensheldt, Deveret M. Howell, Michael Hunt, Mary Ellen Hurd-Shy, Gary Iorio, Gustavo Iturralde, Sharon Jacobs, Jennifer A. Jacovino, Czeslaw Jagiello, Mohamed Jalloh, Jerimiah Jamison, John Jarvis, Eugeniusz Jastrzebowski, Chiemene Jenkins, James J. Jenkins, Benjamin Jones, Teresa Jurado, Robert Kabakoff, Jerzy Kadziela, Samuel Kahan, Tadeusz Kajda, George Kaperonis, Waldemar Kapkowski, Keith Kaplan, Stanislaw Karpierz, Jeffrey Kegler, James T. Keller, Joyce Keller, Mark S. Kelly, Brian Kemp, John L. Kemp, Volodymyr Khomik, Richard Kiggins, Thomas F. King, Erwin Kirbach, Quentin Kirkland, David Kogan, William Otto Koladzyn, Linus Korieocha, Howard Kosta, Tadeusz Kowalewski, Jan Kozinski, Amy Krakow, Fred J. Krines, Jozef Z. Kruczak, Stanislaw Kubrak, Zbigniew Kucharski, Marian Kuczaj, Zygmunt Kwiatkowski, Sorel LaFaurie, Frances LaPointe, George Lamoreaux, Alexander Landi, Zdzislaw Langier, Tadeusz Larwa, Andrzej Lasica, Susan Latham, John H. Lavelle, Valeriy Lavruk, Susan Lawrence, Darryl Lee, Antoni Lelek, Richard Lennon, Marianne Leto, David Levy, Diane Lewis, Joseph Lewis, Mark Libecci, Maritza Liriano, Marian A. Lizzio, Gloria Llanes, Jose Llaverias, Pascual Llibri, Julio C. Lliguicota, Nicolas Loaiza, Edward Lobue, Maxine Londner, Luz Stella Lopez, Rance Louallen, Jason B. Lowenfeld, Henry Lozano, Jaroslaw Ludwiczak, Deborah Lupard, William Lutter, Volodymyr Lyseyko, Alexander Macias, Daniel Mackey, Jean-Anne Mackrell, Joseph Maddaloni, Jozef Madej, Peter C. Maguire Jr., Piotr Majewski, Igor J. Makar, Marian Maksimiuk, Hopeton Malcolm, Thomas Maloney, Robert Mandell, Zbigniew Mankiewicz, Jose A. Manrique, Janusz Marcinkowski, Maria Marino, Carmen Marte, Doris Martinez, Geraldo Martinez, Susana Martinez, Raul Martinez Sr., Luis Martinez-Nicolas, Nelson Marty, Thomas Marucheau, Diana C. Matthews, Ernest K. Matthews, Piotr Matuszewski, Todd Mayer, Julio Mayorga, Robert McAllister, James E. McCullough, Greg McDonald, Joseph McDonald, Robert E. McFeeley, Ryan McGinty, Kristin McGrath, Peter McGrath, Thomas McHugh, Albert McIntosh, Rickie McKie, Fain McKinney, Thomas McMahon, Kevin McPartland, Michael McPhillips, Michael Thomas McPhillips, Phillip McQueen, Rosa Medina, Thelmore Meeks, Carmen Mena, Tommy Mendez, William R. Mendez, John Mescall, Wojciech Michalik, Doretha Middleton, Ireneusz Mierzejewski, Tadeusz Milek, Russell Millar, Elizabeth A. Miller, Barbara Minsky, Thomas Miraglia, Francisco Mite, Robbill Mohammed, William J. Moise Jr., Curtis Charles Mondesir, Alexis Monroe, Clara Montague, Dominick M. Montalto Jr., Nino Montano, Debra Anne Monte, Marlene Monteleone, Joseph Montwaid, Debbie Morales, Jerry Morales, Raymond Morales, Jose Morales Jr., Jacqueline Morrison, Teresa Morrone, Nicholas Moscato, Aluko Mose, Michael Mulvaney, William Mulzet, Edgar Munoz, Esperanza Munoz, Hernan Munoz, Charles Murphy, Kenneth L. Murray, Jerzy Muszkatel, William Myerwold, John Napolitano, Jose Naranjo, Margaret Nasta, William Neary, Andrejz Nerc, Shedricka Nesbitt, Ronalda Nicholas-Frazier, Jan Niedziela, Ed Nigri, Kenrick Nisbett, Miguel Nolasco, Matthew Norton, Rosa Nunez, Emeka Nwigwe, Daniel O'Brien, Walter R. O'Donnell, Ryszard Obiedzinski, John Odia, Isioma Ogbue, Patrick Okeefe, Michael Oliva, Virginia Ortiz, Wanda I. Ortiz, Guillermo Osorio, Lili Packer, Tadeusz Pajerski, William Parker, Oneil Parkes, Miller M. Parra, Derek L. Partee, Vasilios Parthenis, John Patino, Priscilla Payne, Richard J. Pearse, Lawrence Pearson, Gabriel Pena, Juan Carlos Pena, Juan B. Peralta, Oscar Perez, Maria Perez-Delgado, Lee Perlman, Robert Perniciaro, Vanessa Pero, Howard Perry, Christine Clausi Petosa, Adrian Pierce, Janusz Piersa, Michael Pignatelli, Lorenzo Pittman, Jozef Pogorzelski, Piotr Polak, Joseph Polidoro, Jan Pomichowski, Candelaria Porras, Raymond Pose, Juan Prada, Stanislaw Pszeniczny, Maria Puello, Manuel Puli, Dioselina Quintana, Joseph Racanelli, Stanislaw Radzieta, Juan Rakela, Arlene Ramery, Iris Ramirez, Nubia Ramirez, Ramiro Ramirez, Ramona Ramirez, William I. Ramirezy, Jagjewan Ramroop, Arlene Reddick, Dennis Reilly, Karen Reoch, Julio Repetto, Marian Retelski, Antonia Rivera, Jose A. Rivera, Minerva Rivera, Benjamin Rivers, Germano Riviera, Juan Carlos Roa, Kevin F. Robinson, Yvonne Robinson, Daniel Rodgers, Americo Rodriguez, Anibal Rodriguez, Ramiro Rodriguez, Rosemary Rodriguez, Witold Roginski, Josefina Rosado, Mark Roseman, Sam Roseman, Mark Rothman, Dragica Roy, Ignacy Rozanski, Steven Ruggiero, Joseph Russo, Eunicestine Rutledge, Surjit Saini, Yvonne Salaman, Joffre Salinas, Ralph Salomone, Demetrius Samadjopoulos, Richard Sammarco, Alex Anthony Sanchez, German Sanchez, Anthony Santa Maria, Felix Santana, Andrew M. Santeramo, Ruben Santos, Vincent Sarcone, Joseph Savoca, William Schmitt, Sylvia Schmitz, Raymond Schnarr, Robert Schnelle, Robert N. Schroh, William Schuchat, Peter Seeman, Jeffrey Scott Seide, Martha Sepulveda, Robert Serrone, James G. Service, Suvarna Shah, David Sharinn, James Sheehan, Jacek Sieka, Robert Sienkiewicz, Jose Siguachi, Rosa Siguencia, Walter Silverman, Dara Simon, Cheryl Simpkins, Barbara Singleton, Mark Sly, Terence J. Smith, Mieczyslaw Smoderek, Jose Sobral, Jonathan W. Socha, Jozef Sokolowski, Ramon Sola, Victor Solis, George Pope Solomon, David B. Sontz, Ramdial Sookhai, Pawel Stepniewicz, Barry Stevens, Brion Stewart, Paul Stutz, Dolores Suarez, Juan Suarez, Timothy Sullivan, Linda Suwidji, Paul Tacconi, Albert Talker, Christopher Tangney, Herminio Tapanes, Halina Tapia, Frank Taylor, Gregory Thomas, Paul Thyberg, John Toledo, Minerva Toro, Enoel Torres, Guillermo Torres, Nilda Torres, Lily Trofimoff, James B. Troncoso Jr., Minerva Tross, Richard Trotta, Iliana Troya, Omar Ulffe, Joseph M. Urso, Christopher Uszynski, Jose Santos Vaca, Rafael Valdez, Mario Valenzuela, Dr. Donald Valerino, Anthony Vangeli, Sonia Varela, Edwin Vargas, Veronica Vasquez-Salinas, Rafael A. Velasco, Liana Velasquez, George L. Velez, Noel Velez, Kimete Velic, Daniel Venditti, Frank Ventimiglia, Walter Villafuerte, Gregory Voce, Deborah Washington, Emanuel R. Weisgras, Wynelle Welch, Rose Wells, Scott Wetter, David Whalen, Laura W
June 9, 2017 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS -CASE NUMBER ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom or Saudi Arabia and Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia and Herzegovina, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Howard Abrams, Tony Agyman, Barry Aissatou, Vladimir Akoulov, Blanche Alejandro, Arnaldo Almonte, Telma Alvarado, Hernan Alvarez, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Wilmer Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Neil Attardi, Jan Bachusz, Andrzej Badzio, Aleksander Bajguz, Richard Baker, Arina Bakhareva, Fernando Baracaldo, Richard Barnett, Michael Barrett, Wladyslaw Barszcz, Michael Bartone, Gennadiy Barykin, Jose A. Batista, Stanley Becton, Nathan Bednarsh, Jose Luis Bello, Joseph Belmonte, Joseph Benbow, Frances Benjamin, Rhoda Berger, Richard F. Bergmann, Martha Bermudez, Claudia S. Bernstein, Jeffrey Bernstein, Trevor Berridge, Michelle Berti, Dariusz Bienduga, Leszek Bieniek, Yuriy Bilonozhenko, Miroslaw Binko, John Bitsko, Gustavo Blandon, Robert Park Borchert, Barbara Boursiquot, Sheila Boyette, Michelle Bracey, Ernestine Branch, Gwendolyn Brandt, Paul Brobeck, Michal Brodacki, Alan Brown, Michael Browne, Heather Browne-Dee, Barry Bryan, Phillip R. Bryant, Esteban Bueno, Robert A. Burmeister, Stanislaw Burzynski, Heather Cabrera, Angela Calhoun, Clay Calle, Felix Calle, Luis Calle, Coretta Callender-Faulk, Ana Camacho, Stephanie Campbell, Jorge Campoverde, Leonardo Cano, Carrie Cantey, Howard Caplan, Sonia M. Capon, Carlos Cardenas, James Carriel, Tokeato Carter, Raymond Cassar, Dennis Cassidy, Gisel Castro, Hector Castro, Joseph A. Cella, Thomas Joseph Cera, Gerome Cerverizzo, Maria Chainoha, Robert S. Chapman, Sonja Checinski, Manuel Checo, Cindy Cheung, Joseph Chierchio, Odessa Chin, Dariusz Chojnowski, Franciszek Chojnowski, Miguel Chung, Neville Chung, Elzbieta Ciborowska, Henryk Ciborowski, Romuald Cieslak, Michael Cioffi, Gerard Ciquera, Mark Clarke-Milton, Jose Collado, Yudelka Collado, Gerald Colon, Maritza Colon, Patrick Colossi, Robert Conti, Francisco Cordova, Galo Cordova, Dallas Cromwell, Curtis Crowe, Patrick Crowley, Muriel Cunningham, Mathew Cusumano, Zbigniew Czachurski, Jozef Czubat, Jerzy Czypinisz, Alex Daikoku, John J. Dalton, Charles DeMarco, Donna DeSoto, Frank Degirolamo, Richard Delfino, Barbara Demarco, Leonard Desilva, Castrenze DiCarlo, Rosa Diaz Alvarez, Stephen M. Dietz, Robert Dinnen, Waldemar Directie, Boguslaw Dlugosz, John Dobies, Jan Dobrowolski, William Dolan, Peter Donahue, Kathleen Donavon, James Donohue, Denis Dooley, James Doran, Louis Duclerc, Jose Dumet, Sergiu Dumitrache, Rudolph Dyer, Stanislaw Dziadezykowski, Linda Eaton-Lewis, George Echebiri, Laurie Edwards, Maria Encarnacion, Karen Eremita, Wandalesca Espinal, Erika Espinosa, Alonso Espinoza, Jorge Espinoza, Rosa Espinoza, Ana Estrella, Colombina Estrella, Royal Eversley, Lena Fabian-Slim, Maria Fajardo, William Fallon, Stanislaw S. Faltynowicz, Joan M. Farrell, Joanne Felicetta, Anita Ferdinand, Maria Fernanda Garcia, Milagros Fernandez, Stanislaw Fic, Teodulo Fiesta, Angel Figueroa, Melinda Figueroa, Milagros Figueroa, Jozef Filipkowski, Richard Filippazzo, Vincent Fiorenza, Joseph Fitzgerald, Robert Fitzpatrick, Leverne Floyd, Ira Fogelgaren, Donna A. Fontana, Manuel Foranoce, Lucyna Foremska, Enrico Frase, Janina Frelas, Mark Gado, George Gaffney, Jadwiga Galazka, Jozef Galazka, Pamela Gallichio, Thomas Galligan, Simone Gallo, Louis Garcia, Luis B. Garcia, Manuel Garcia, Peter A. Gargano, Allen Charles Garner, Delicia Gary, Mozella Gatewood, Jose Emilio Gaviria, Rabiah Gaynor, Mark Gendel, Eugene Gentile, Joseph P. Giamportone, Frank Gianni, Kathy Gibbs, Israel Gil, Peter Giordano, Carlos Raul Gomez, Milton Gordon, Gag Gordova, John P. Gorea Jr., Ryszard Gorecki, Alexander Gorelik, Frank Gorglione, Henryk Grabowski, Marcin Grabowski, Ann Grant, Jerkeida R. Grant, Alfonza Green, Rose E. Gribben, Allan Grier, Yvette Griffins, Mark Groblewski, Edward Groger, Diovani Gutierrez, Michael Hafey, Anthony Hall, Patrick Hansen, Thomas Harden, Rose Harris, Julie Harvey, Rosaria J. Heide, Matthew Henderson, Ruth Hermosilla, Maria Hernandez, Orlando Hernandez, Carlos L. Herrera, John Hickman, Kirk Hohensheldt, Deveret M. Howell, Michael Hunt, Mary Ellen Hurd-Shy, Gary Iorio, Gustavo Iturralde, Sharon Jacobs, Jennifer A. Jacovino, Czeslaw Jagiello, Mohamed Jalloh, Jerimiah Jamison, John Jarvis, Eugeniusz Jastrzebowski, Chiemene Jenkins, James J. Jenkins, Benjamin Jones, Teresa Jurado, Robert Kabakoff, Jerzy Kadziela, Samuel Kahan, Tadeusz Kajda, George Kaperonis, Waldemar Kapkowski, Keith Kaplan, Stanislaw Karpierz, Jeffrey Kegler, James T. Keller, Joyce Keller, Mark S. Kelly, Brian Kemp, John L. Kemp, Volodymyr Khomik, Richard Kiggins, Thomas F. King, Erwin Kirbach, Quentin Kirkland, David Kogan, William Otto Koladzyn, Linus Korieocha, Howard Kosta, Tadeusz Kowalewski, Jan Kozinski, Amy Krakow, Fred J. Krines, Jozef Z. Kruczak, Stanislaw Kubrak, Zbigniew Kucharski, Marian Kuczaj, Zygmunt Kwiatkowski, Sorel LaFaurie, Frances LaPointe, George Lamoreaux, Alexander Landi, Zdzislaw Langier, Tadeusz Larwa, Andrzej Lasica, Susan Latham, John H. Lavelle, Valeriy Lavruk, Susan Lawrence, Darryl Lee, Antoni Lelek, Richard Lennon, Marianne Leto, David Levy, Diane Lewis, Joseph Lewis, Mark Libecci, Maritza Liriano, Marian A. Lizzio, Gloria Llanes, Jose Llaverias, Pascual Llibri, Julio C. Lliguicota, Nicolas Loaiza, Edward Lobue, Maxine Londner, Luz Stella Lopez, Rance Louallen, Jason B. Lowenfeld, Henry Lozano, Jaroslaw Ludwiczak, Deborah Lupard, William Lutter, Volodymyr Lyseyko, Alexander Macias, Daniel Mackey, Jean-Anne Mackrell, Joseph Maddaloni, Jozef Madej, Peter C. Maguire Jr., Piotr Majewski, Igor J. Makar, Marian Maksimiuk, Hopeton Malcolm, Thomas Maloney, Robert Mandell, Zbigniew Mankiewicz, Jose A. Manrique, Janusz Marcinkowski, Maria Marino, Carmen Marte, Doris Martinez, Geraldo Martinez, Susana Martinez, Raul Martinez Sr., Luis Martinez-Nicolas, Nelson Marty, Thomas Marucheau, Diana C. Matthews, Ernest K. Matthews, Piotr Matuszewski, Todd Mayer, Julio Mayorga, Robert McAllister, James E. McCullough, Greg McDonald, Joseph McDonald, Robert E. McFeeley, Ryan McGinty, Kristin McGrath, Peter McGrath, Thomas McHugh, Albert McIntosh, Rickie McKie, Fain McKinney, Thomas McMahon, Kevin McPartland, Michael McPhillips, Michael Thomas McPhillips, Phillip McQueen, Rosa Medina, Thelmore Meeks, Carmen Mena, Tommy Mendez, William R. Mendez, John Mescall, Wojciech Michalik, Doretha Middleton, Ireneusz Mierzejewski, Tadeusz Milek, Russell Millar, Elizabeth A. Miller, Barbara Minsky, Thomas Miraglia, Francisco Mite, Robbill Mohammed, William J. Moise Jr., Curtis Charles Mondesir, Alexis Monroe, Clara Montague, Dominick M. Montalto Jr., Nino Montano, Debra Anne Monte, Marlene Monteleone, Joseph Montwaid, Debbie Morales, Jerry Morales, Raymond Morales, Jose Morales Jr., Jacqueline Morrison, Teresa Morrone, Nicholas Moscato, Aluko Mose, Michael Mulvaney, William Mulzet, Edgar Munoz, Esperanza Munoz, Hernan Munoz, Charles Murphy, Kenneth L. Murray, Jerzy Muszkatel, William Myerwold, John Napolitano, Jose Naranjo, Margaret Nasta, William Neary, Andrejz Nerc, Shedricka Nesbitt, Ronalda Nicholas-Frazier, Jan Niedziela, Ed Nigri, Kenrick Nisbett, Miguel Nolasco, Matthew Norton, Rosa Nunez, Emeka Nwigwe, Daniel O'Brien, Walter R. O'Donnell, Ryszard Obiedzinski, John Odia, Isioma Ogbue, Patrick Okeefe, Michael Oliva, Virginia Ortiz, Wanda I. Ortiz, Guillermo Osorio, Lili Packer, Tadeusz Pajerski, William Parker, Oneil Parkes, Miller M. Parra, Derek L. Partee, Vasilios Parthenis, John Patino, Priscilla Payne, Richard J. Pearse, Lawrence Pearson, Gabriel Pena, Juan Carlos Pena, Juan B. Peralta, Oscar Perez, Maria Perez-Delgado, Lee Perlman, Robert Perniciaro, Vanessa Pero, Howard Perry, Christine Clausi Petosa, Adrian Pierce, Janusz Piersa, Michael Pignatelli, Lorenzo Pittman, Jozef Pogorzelski, Piotr Polak, Joseph Polidoro, Jan Pomichowski, Candelaria Porras, Raymond Pose, Juan Prada, Stanislaw Pszeniczny, Maria Puello, Manuel Puli, Dioselina Quintana, Joseph Racanelli, Stanislaw Radzieta, Juan Rakela, Arlene Ramery, Iris Ramirez, Nubia Ramirez, Ramiro Ramirez, Ramona Ramirez, William I. Ramirezy, Jagjewan Ramroop, Arlene Reddick, Dennis Reilly, Karen Reoch, Julio Repetto, Marian Retelski, Antonia Rivera, Jose A. Rivera, Minerva Rivera, Benjamin Rivers, Germano Riviera, Juan Carlos Roa, Kevin F. Robinson, Yvonne Robinson, Daniel Rodgers, Americo Rodriguez, Anibal Rodriguez, Ramiro Rodriguez, Rosemary Rodriguez, Witold Roginski, Josefina Rosado, Mark Roseman, Sam Roseman, Mark Rothman, Dragica Roy, Ignacy Rozanski, Steven Ruggiero, Joseph Russo, Eunicestine Rutledge, Surjit Saini, Yvonne Salaman, Joffre Salinas, Ralph Salomone, Demetrius Samadjopoulos, Richard Sammarco, Alex Anthony Sanchez, German Sanchez, Anthony Santa Maria, Felix Santana, Andrew M. Santeramo, Ruben Santos, Vincent Sarcone, Joseph Savoca, William Schmitt, Sylvia Schmitz, Raymond Schnarr, Robert Schnelle, Robert N. Schroh, William Schuchat, Peter Seeman, Jeffrey Scott Seide, Martha Sepulveda, Robert Serrone, James G. Service, Suvarna Shah, David Sharinn, James Sheehan, Jacek Sieka, Robert Sienkiewicz, Jose Siguachi, Rosa Siguencia, Walter Silverman, Dara Simon, Cheryl Simpkins, Barbara Singleton, Mark Sly, Terence J. Smith, Mieczyslaw Smoderek, Jose Sobral, Jonathan W. Socha, Jozef Sokolowski, Ramon Sola, Victor Solis, George Pope Solomon, David B. Sontz, Ramdial Sookhai, Pawel Stepniewicz, Barry Stevens, Brion Stewart, Paul Stutz, Dolores Suarez, Juan Suarez, Timothy Sullivan, Linda Suwidji, Paul Tacconi, Albert Talker, Christopher Tangney, Herminio Tapanes, Halina Tapia, Frank Taylor, Gregory Thomas, Paul Thyberg, John Toledo, Minerva Toro, Enoel Torres, Guillermo Torres, Nilda Torres, Lily Trofimoff, James B. Troncoso Jr., Minerva Tross, Richard Trotta, Iliana Troya, Omar Ulffe, Joseph M. Urso, Christopher Uszynski, Jose Santos Vaca, Rafael Valdez, Mario Valenzuela, Dr. Donald Valerino, Anthony Vangeli, Sonia Varela, Edwin Vargas, Veronica Vasquez-Salinas, Rafael A. Velasco, Liana Velasquez, George L. Velez, Noel Velez, Kimete Velic, Daniel Venditti, Frank Ventimiglia, Walter Villafuerte, Gregory Voce, Deborah Washington
June 9, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): PLEASE ENTER AS TO WHO THE SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED FOR IN DOCKET TEXT/ENTRY. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (kl)
June 9, 2017 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (kl)
June 9, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (kl)
June 9, 2017 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (kl)
June 8, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Allen Grochow on behalf of Howard Abrams, Tony Agyman, Barry Aissatou, Vladimir Akoulov, Blanche Alejandro, Arnaldo Almonte, Telma Alvarado, Hernan Alvarez, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Wilmer Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Neil Attardi, Jan Bachusz, Andrzej Badzio, Aleksander Bajguz, Richard Baker, Arina Bakhareva, Fernando Baracaldo, Richard Barnett, Michael Barrett, Wladyslaw Barszcz, Michael Bartone, Gennadiy Barykin, Jose A. Batista, Stanley Becton, Nathan Bednarsh, Jose Luis Bello, Joseph Belmonte, Joseph Benbow, Frances Benjamin, Rhoda Berger, Richard F. Bergmann, Martha Bermudez, Claudia S. Bernstein, Jeffrey Bernstein, Trevor Berridge, Michelle Berti, Dariusz Bienduga, Leszek Bieniek, Yuriy Bilonozhenko, Miroslaw Binko, John Bitsko, Gustavo Blandon, Robert Park Borchert, Barbara Boursiquot, Sheila Boyette, Michelle Bracey, Ernestine Branch, Gwendolyn Brandt, Paul Brobeck, Michal Brodacki, Alan Brown, Michael Browne, Heather Browne-Dee, Barry Bryan, Phillip R. Bryant, Esteban Bueno, Robert A. Burmeister, Stanislaw Burzynski, Heather Cabrera, Angela Calhoun, Clay Calle, Felix Calle, Luis Calle, Coretta Callender-Faulk, Ana Camacho, Stephanie Campbell, Jorge Campoverde, Leonardo Cano, Carrie Cantey, Howard Caplan, Sonia M. Capon, Carlos Cardenas, James Carriel, Tokeato Carter, Raymond Cassar, Dennis Cassidy, Gisel Castro, Hector Castro, Joseph A. Cella, Thomas Joseph Cera, Gerome Cerverizzo, Maria Chainoha, Robert S. Chapman, Sonja Checinski, Manuel Checo, Cindy Cheung, Joseph Chierchio, Odessa Chin, Dariusz Chojnowski, Franciszek Chojnowski, Miguel Chung, Neville Chung, Elzbieta Ciborowska, Henryk Ciborowski, Romuald Cieslak, Michael Cioffi, Gerard Ciquera, Mark Clarke-Milton, Jose Collado, Yudelka Collado, Gerald Colon, Maritza Colon, Patrick Colossi, Robert Conti, Francisco Cordova, Galo Cordova, Dallas Cromwell, Curtis Crowe, Patrick Crowley, Muriel Cunningham, Mathew Cusumano, Zbigniew Czachurski, Jozef Czubat, Jerzy Czypinisz, Alex Daikoku, John J. Dalton, Charles DeMarco, Donna DeSoto, Frank Degirolamo, Richard Delfino, Barbara Demarco, Leonard Desilva, Castrenze DiCarlo, Rosa Diaz Alvarez, Stephen M. Dietz, Robert Dinnen, Waldemar Directie, Boguslaw Dlugosz, John Dobies, Jan Dobrowolski, William Dolan, Peter Donahue, Kathleen Donavon, James Donohue, Denis Dooley, James Doran, Louis Duclerc, Jose Dumet, Sergiu Dumitrache, Rudolph Dyer, Stanislaw Dziadezykowski, Linda Eaton-Lewis, George Echebiri, Laurie Edwards, Maria Encarnacion, Karen Eremita, Wandalesca Espinal, Erika Espinosa, Alonso Espinoza, Jorge Espinoza, Rosa Espinoza, Ana Estrella, Colombina Estrella, Royal Eversley, Lena Fabian-Slim, Maria Fajardo, William Fallon, Stanislaw S. Faltynowicz, Joan M. Farrell, Joanne Felicetta, Anita Ferdinand, Maria Fernanda Garcia, Milagros Fernandez, Stanislaw Fic, Teodulo Fiesta, Angel Figueroa, Melinda Figueroa, Milagros Figueroa, Jozef Filipkowski, Richard Filippazzo, Vincent Fiorenza, Joseph Fitzgerald, Robert Fitzpatrick, Leverne Floyd, Ira Fogelgaren, Donna A. Fontana, Manuel Foranoce, Lucyna Foremska, Enrico Frase, Janina Frelas, Mark Gado, George Gaffney, Jadwiga Galazka, Jozef Galazka, Pamela Gallichio, Thomas Galligan, Simone Gallo, Louis Garcia, Luis B. Garcia, Manuel Garcia, Peter A. Gargano, Allen Charles Garner, Delicia Gary, Mozella Gatewood, Jose Emilio Gaviria, Rabiah Gaynor, Mark Gendel, Eugene Gentile, Joseph P. Giamportone, Frank Gianni, Kathy Gibbs, Israel Gil, Peter Giordano, Carlos Raul Gomez, Milton Gordon, Gag Gordova, John P. Gorea Jr., Ryszard Gorecki, Alexander Gorelik, Frank Gorglione, Henryk Grabowski, Marcin Grabowski, Ann Grant, Jerkeida R. Grant, Alfonza Green, Rose E. Gribben, Allan Grier, Yvette Griffins, Mark Groblewski, Edward Groger, Diovani Gutierrez, Michael Hafey, Anthony Hall, Patrick Hansen, Thomas Harden, Rose Harris, Julie Harvey, Rosaria J. Heide, Matthew Henderson, Ruth Hermosilla, Maria Hernandez, Orlando Hernandez, Carlos L. Herrera, John Hickman, Kirk Hohensheldt, Deveret M. Howell, Michael Hunt, Mary Ellen Hurd-Shy, Gary Iorio, Gustavo Iturralde, Sharon Jacobs, Jennifer A. Jacovino, Czeslaw Jagiello, Mohamed Jalloh, Jerimiah Jamison, John Jarvis, Eugeniusz Jastrzebowski, Chiemene Jenkins, James J. Jenkins, Benjamin Jones, Teresa Jurado, Robert Kabakoff, Jerzy Kadziela, Samuel Kahan, Tadeusz Kajda, George Kaperonis, Waldemar Kapkowski, Keith Kaplan, Stanislaw Karpierz, Jeffrey Kegler, James T. Keller, Joyce Keller, Mark S. Kelly, Brian Kemp, John L. Kemp, Volodymyr Khomik, Richard Kiggins, Thomas F. King, Erwin Kirbach, Quentin Kirkland, David Kogan, William Otto Koladzyn, Linus Korieocha, Howard Kosta, Tadeusz Kowalewski, Jan Kozinski, Amy Krakow, Fred J. Krines, Jozef Z. Kruczak, Stanislaw Kubrak, Zbigniew Kucharski, Marian Kuczaj, Zygmunt Kwiatkowski, Sorel LaFaurie, Frances LaPointe, George Lamoreaux, Alexander Landi, Zdzislaw Langier, Tadeusz Larwa, Andrzej Lasica, Susan Latham, John H. Lavelle, Valeriy Lavruk, Susan Lawrence, Darryl Lee, Antoni Lelek, Richard Lennon, Marianne Leto, David Levy, Diane Lewis, Joseph Lewis, Mark Libecci, Maritza Liriano, Marian A. Lizzio, Gloria Llanes, Jose Llaverias, Pascual Llibri, Julio C. Lliguicota, Nicolas Loaiza, Edward Lobue, Maxine Londner, Luz Stella Lopez, Rance Louallen, Jason B. Lowenfeld, Henry Lozano, Jaroslaw Ludwiczak, Deborah Lupard, William Lutter, Volodymyr Lyseyko, Alexander Macias, Daniel Mackey, Jean-Anne Mackrell, Joseph Maddaloni, Jozef Madej, Peter C. Maguire Jr., Piotr Majewski, Igor J. Makar, Marian Maksimiuk, Hopeton Malcolm, Thomas Maloney, Robert Mandell, Zbigniew Mankiewicz, Jose A. Manrique, Janusz Marcinkowski, Maria Marino, Carmen Marte, Doris Martinez, Geraldo Martinez, Susana Martinez, Raul Martinez Sr., Luis Martinez-Nicolas, Nelson Marty, Thomas Marucheau, Diana C. Matthews, Ernest K. Matthews, Piotr Matuszewski, Todd Mayer, Julio Mayorga, Robert McAllister, James E. McCullough, Greg McDonald, Joseph McDonald, Robert E. McFeeley, Ryan McGinty, Kristin McGrath, Peter McGrath, Thomas McHugh, Albert McIntosh, Rickie McKie, Fain McKinney, Thomas McMahon, Kevin McPartland, Michael McPhillips, Michael Thomas McPhillips, Phillip McQueen, Rosa Medina, Thelmore Meeks, Carmen Mena, Tommy Mendez, William R. Mendez, John Mescall, Wojciech Michalik, Doretha Middleton, Ireneusz Mierzejewski, Tadeusz Milek, Russell Millar, Elizabeth A. Miller, Barbara Minsky, Thomas Miraglia, Francisco Mite, Robbill Mohammed, William J. Moise Jr., Curtis Charles Mondesir, Alexis Monroe, Clara Montague, Dominick M. Montalto Jr., Nino Montano, Debra Anne Monte, Marlene Monteleone, Joseph Montwaid, Debbie Morales, Jerry Morales, Raymond Morales, Jose Morales Jr., Jacqueline Morrison, Teresa Morrone, Nicholas Moscato, Aluko Mose, Michael Mulvaney, William Mulzet, Edgar Munoz, Esperanza Munoz, Hernan Munoz, Charles Murphy, Kenneth L. Murray, Jerzy Muszkatel, William Myerwold, John Napolitano, Jose Naranjo, Margaret Nasta, William Neary, Andrejz Nerc, Shedricka Nesbitt, Ronalda Nicholas-Frazier, Jan Niedziela, Ed Nigri, Kenrick Nisbett, Miguel Nolasco, Matthew Norton, Rosa Nunez, Emeka Nwigwe, Daniel O'Brien, Walter R. O'Donnell, Ryszard Obiedzinski, John Odia, Isioma Ogbue, Patrick Okeefe, Michael Oliva, Virginia Ortiz, Wanda I. Ortiz, Guillermo Osorio, Lili Packer, Tadeusz Pajerski, William Parker, Oneil Parkes, Miller M. Parra, Derek L. Partee, Vasilios Parthenis, John Patino, Priscilla Payne, Richard J. Pearse, Lawrence Pearson, Gabriel Pena, Juan Carlos Pena, Juan B. Peralta, Oscar Perez, Maria Perez-Delgado, Lee Perlman, Robert Perniciaro, Vanessa Pero, Howard Perry, Christine Clausi Petosa, Adrian Pierce, Janusz Piersa, Michael Pignatelli, Lorenzo Pittman, Jozef Pogorzelski, Piotr Polak, Joseph Polidoro, Jan Pomichowski, Candelaria Porras, Raymond Pose, Juan Prada, Stanislaw Pszeniczny, Maria Puello, Manuel Puli, Dioselina Quintana, Joseph Racanelli, Stanislaw Radzieta, Juan Rakela, Arlene Ramery, Iris Ramirez, Nubia Ramirez, Ramiro Ramirez, Ramona Ramirez, William I. Ramirezy, Jagjewan Ramroop, Arlene Reddick, Dennis Reilly, Karen Reoch, Julio Repetto, Marian Retelski, Antonia Rivera, Jose A. Rivera, Minerva Rivera, Benjamin Rivers, Germano Riviera, Juan Carlos Roa, Kevin F. Robinson, Yvonne Robinson, Daniel Rodgers, Americo Rodriguez, Anibal Rodriguez, Ramiro Rodriguez, Rosemary Rodriguez, Witold Roginski, Josefina Rosado, Mark Roseman, Sam Roseman, Mark Rothman, Dragica Roy, Ignacy Rozanski, Steven Ruggiero, Joseph Russo, Eunicestine Rutledge, Surjit Saini, Yvonne Salaman, Joffre Salinas, Ralph Salomone, Demetrius Samadjopoulos, Richard Sammarco, Alex Anthony Sanchez, German Sanchez, Anthony Santa Maria, Felix Santana, Andrew M. Santeramo, Ruben Santos, Vincent Sarcone, Joseph Savoca, William Schmitt, Sylvia Schmitz, Raymond Schnarr, Robert Schnelle, Robert N. Schroh, William Schuchat, Peter Seeman, Jeffrey Scott Seide, Martha Sepulveda, Robert Serrone, James G. Service, Suvarna Shah, David Sharinn, James Sheehan, Jacek Sieka, Robert Sienkiewicz, Jose Siguachi, Rosa Siguencia, Walter Silverman, Dara Simon, Cheryl Simpkins, Barbara Singleton, Mark Sly, Terence J. Smith, Mieczyslaw Smoderek, Jose Sobral, Jonathan W. Socha, Jozef Sokolowski, Ramon Sola, Victor Solis, George Pope Solomon, David B. Sontz, Ramdial Sookhai, Pawel Stepniewicz, Barry Stevens, Brion Stewart, Paul Stutz, Dolores Suarez, Juan Suarez, Timothy Sullivan, Linda Suwidji, Paul Tacconi, Albert Talker, Christopher Tangney, Herminio Tapanes, Halina Tapia, Frank Taylor, Gregory Thomas, Paul Thyberg, John Toledo, Minerva Toro, Enoel Torres, Guillermo Torres, Nilda Torres, Lily Trofimoff, James B. Troncoso Jr., Minerva Tross, Richard Trotta, Iliana Troya, Omar Ulffe, Joseph M. Urso, Christopher Uszynski, Jose Santos Vaca, Rafael Valdez, Mario Valenzuela, Dr. Donald Valerino, Anthony Vangeli, Sonia Varela, Edwin Vargas, Veronica Vasquez-Salinas, Rafael A. Velasco, Liana Velasquez, George L. Velez, Noel Velez, Kimete Velic, Daniel Venditti, Frank Ventimiglia, Walter Villafuerte, Gregory Voce, Deborah Washington, Emanuel R. Weisgras, Wynelle Welch, Rose Wells, Scott Wetter, David Whalen, Laura Whickum, Marva M. White, Stewart Wilkins, Gersham Williams, Richard C. Wi
June 8, 2017 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS -PARTY ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Howard Abrams, Tony Agyman, Barry Aissatou, Vladimir Akoulov, Blanche Alejandro, Arnaldo Almonte, Telma Alvarado, Hernan Alvarez, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Wilmer Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Neil Attardi, Jan Bachusz, Andrzej Badzio, Aleksander Bajguz, Richard Baker, Arina Bakhareva, Fernando Baracaldo, Richard Barnett, Michael Barrett, Wladyslaw Barszcz, Michael Bartone, Gennadiy Barykin, Jose A. Batista, Stanley Becton, Nathan Bednarsh, Jose Luis Bello, Joseph Belmonte, Joseph Benbow, Frances Benjamin, Rhoda Berger, Richard F. Bergmann, Martha Bermudez, Claudia S. Bernstein, Jeffrey Bernstein, Trevor Berridge, Michelle Berti, Dariusz Bienduga, Leszek Bieniek, Yuriy Bilonozhenko, Miroslaw Binko, John Bitsko, Gustavo Blandon, Robert Park Borchert, Barbara Boursiquot, Sheila Boyette, Michelle Bracey, Ernestine Branch, Gwendolyn Brandt, Paul Brobeck, Michal Brodacki, Alan Brown, Michael Browne, Heather Browne-Dee, Barry Bryan, Phillip R. Bryant, Esteban Bueno, Robert A. Burmeister, Stanislaw Burzynski, Heather Cabrera, Angela Calhoun, Clay Calle, Felix Calle, Luis Calle, Coretta Callender-Faulk, Ana Camacho, Stephanie Campbell, Jorge Campoverde, Leonardo Cano, Carrie Cantey, Howard Caplan, Sonia M. Capon, Carlos Cardenas, James Carriel, Tokeato Carter, Raymond Cassar, Dennis Cassidy, Gisel Castro, Hector Castro, Joseph A. Cella, Thomas Joseph Cera, Gerome Cerverizzo, Maria Chainoha, Robert S. Chapman, Sonja Checinski, Manuel Checo, Cindy Cheung, Joseph Chierchio, Odessa Chin, Dariusz Chojnowski, Franciszek Chojnowski, Miguel Chung, Neville Chung, Elzbieta Ciborowska, Henryk Ciborowski, Romuald Cieslak, Michael Cioffi, Gerard Ciquera, Mark Clarke-Milton, Jose Collado, Yudelka Collado, Gerald Colon, Maritza Colon, Patrick Colossi, Robert Conti, Francisco Cordova, Galo Cordova, Dallas Cromwell, Curtis Crowe, Patrick Crowley, Muriel Cunningham, Mathew Cusumano, Zbigniew Czachurski, Jozef Czubat, Jerzy Czypinisz, Alex Daikoku, John J. Dalton, Charles DeMarco, Donna DeSoto, Frank Degirolamo, Richard Delfino, Barbara Demarco, Leonard Desilva, Castrenze DiCarlo, Rosa Diaz Alvarez, Stephen M. Dietz, Robert Dinnen, Waldemar Directie, Boguslaw Dlugosz, John Dobies, Jan Dobrowolski, William Dolan, Peter Donahue, Kathleen Donavon, James Donohue, Denis Dooley, James Doran, Louis Duclerc, Jose Dumet, Sergiu Dumitrache, Rudolph Dyer, Stanislaw Dziadezykowski, Linda Eaton-Lewis, George Echebiri, Laurie Edwards, Maria Encarnacion, Karen Eremita, Wandalesca Espinal, Erika Espinosa, Alonso Espinoza, Jorge Espinoza, Rosa Espinoza, Ana Estrella, Colombina Estrella, Royal Eversley, Lena Fabian-Slim, Maria Fajardo, William Fallon, Stanislaw S. Faltynowicz, Joan M. Farrell, Joanne Felicetta, Anita Ferdinand, Maria Fernanda Garcia, Milagros Fernandez, Stanislaw Fic, Teodulo Fiesta, Angel Figueroa, Melinda Figueroa, Milagros Figueroa, Jozef Filipkowski, Richard Filippazzo, Vincent Fiorenza, Joseph Fitzgerald, Robert Fitzpatrick, Leverne Floyd, Ira Fogelgaren, Donna A. Fontana, Manuel Foranoce, Lucyna Foremska, Enrico Frase, Janina Frelas, Mark Gado, George Gaffney, Jadwiga Galazka, Jozef Galazka, Pamela Gallichio, Thomas Galligan, Simone Gallo, Louis Garcia, Luis B. Garcia, Manuel Garcia, Peter A. Gargano, Allen Charles Garner, Delicia Gary, Mozella Gatewood, Jose Emilio Gaviria, Rabiah Gaynor, Mark Gendel, Eugene Gentile, Joseph P. Giamportone, Frank Gianni, Kathy Gibbs, Israel Gil, Peter Giordano, Carlos Raul Gomez, Milton Gordon, Gag Gordova, John P. Gorea Jr., Ryszard Gorecki, Alexander Gorelik, Frank Gorglione, Henryk Grabowski, Marcin Grabowski, Ann Grant, Jerkeida R. Grant, Alfonza Green, Rose E. Gribben, Allan Grier, Yvette Griffins, Mark Groblewski, Edward Groger, Diovani Gutierrez, Michael Hafey, Anthony Hall, Patrick Hansen, Thomas Harden, Rose Harris, Julie Harvey, Rosaria J. Heide, Matthew Henderson, Ruth Hermosilla, Maria Hernandez, Orlando Hernandez, Carlos L. Herrera, John Hickman, Kirk Hohensheldt, Deveret M. Howell, Michael Hunt, Mary Ellen Hurd-Shy, Gary Iorio, Gustavo Iturralde, Sharon Jacobs, Jennifer A. Jacovino, Czeslaw Jagiello, Mohamed Jalloh, Jerimiah Jamison, John Jarvis, Eugeniusz Jastrzebowski, Chiemene Jenkins, James J. Jenkins, Benjamin Jones, Teresa Jurado, Robert Kabakoff, Jerzy Kadziela, Samuel Kahan, Tadeusz Kajda, George Kaperonis, Waldemar Kapkowski, Keith Kaplan, Stanislaw Karpierz, Jeffrey Kegler, James T. Keller, Joyce Keller, Mark S. Kelly, Brian Kemp, John L. Kemp, Volodymyr Khomik, Richard Kiggins, Thomas F. King, Erwin Kirbach, Quentin Kirkland, David Kogan, William Otto Koladzyn, Linus Korieocha, Howard Kosta, Tadeusz Kowalewski, Jan Kozinski, Amy Krakow, Fred J. Krines, Jozef Z. Kruczak, Stanislaw Kubrak, Zbigniew Kucharski, Marian Kuczaj, Zygmunt Kwiatkowski, Sorel LaFaurie, Frances LaPointe, George Lamoreaux, Alexander Landi, Zdzislaw Langier, Tadeusz Larwa, Andrzej Lasica, Susan Latham, John H. Lavelle, Valeriy Lavruk, Susan Lawrence, Darryl Lee, Antoni Lelek, Richard Lennon, Marianne Leto, David Levy, Diane Lewis, Joseph Lewis, Mark Libecci, Maritza Liriano, Marian A. Lizzio, Gloria Llanes, Jose Llaverias, Pascual Llibri, Julio C. Lliguicota, Nicolas Loaiza, Edward Lobue, Maxine Londner, Luz Stella Lopez, Rance Louallen, Jason B. Lowenfeld, Henry Lozano, Jaroslaw Ludwiczak, Deborah Lupard, William Lutter, Volodymyr Lyseyko, Alexander Macias, Daniel Mackey, Jean-Anne Mackrell, Joseph Maddaloni, Jozef Madej, Peter C. Maguire Jr., Piotr Majewski, Igor J. Makar, Marian Maksimiuk, Hopeton Malcolm, Thomas Maloney, Robert Mandell, Zbigniew Mankiewicz, Jose A. Manrique, Janusz Marcinkowski, Maria Marino, Carmen Marte, Doris Martinez, Geraldo Martinez, Susana Martinez, Raul Martinez Sr., Luis Martinez-Nicolas, Nelson Marty, Thomas Marucheau, Diana C. Matthews, Ernest K. Matthews, Piotr Matuszewski, Todd Mayer, Julio Mayorga, Robert McAllister, James E. McCullough, Greg McDonald, Joseph McDonald, Robert E. McFeeley, Ryan McGinty, Kristin McGrath, Peter McGrath, Thomas McHugh, Albert McIntosh, Rickie McKie, Fain McKinney, Thomas McMahon, Kevin McPartland, Michael McPhillips, Michael Thomas McPhillips, Phillip McQueen, Rosa Medina, Thelmore Meeks, Carmen Mena, Tommy Mendez, William R. Mendez, John Mescall, Wojciech Michalik, Doretha Middleton, Ireneusz Mierzejewski, Tadeusz Milek, Russell Millar, Elizabeth A. Miller, Barbara Minsky, Thomas Miraglia, Francisco Mite, Robbill Mohammed, William J. Moise Jr., Curtis Charles Mondesir, Alexis Monroe, Clara Montague, Dominick M. Montalto Jr., Nino Montano, Debra Anne Monte, Marlene Monteleone, Joseph Montwaid, Debbie Morales, Jerry Morales, Raymond Morales, Jose Morales Jr., Jacqueline Morrison, Teresa Morrone, Nicholas Moscato, Aluko Mose, Michael Mulvaney, William Mulzet, Edgar Munoz, Esperanza Munoz, Hernan Munoz, Charles Murphy, Kenneth L. Murray, Jerzy Muszkatel, William Myerwold, John Napolitano, Jose Naranjo, Margaret Nasta, William Neary, Andrejz Nerc, Shedricka Nesbitt, Ronalda Nicholas-Frazier, Jan Niedziela, Ed Nigri, Kenrick Nisbett, Miguel Nolasco, Matthew Norton, Rosa Nunez, Emeka Nwigwe, Daniel O'Brien, Walter R. O'Donnell, Ryszard Obiedzinski, John Odia, Isioma Ogbue, Patrick Okeefe, Michael Oliva, Virginia Ortiz, Wanda I. Ortiz, Guillermo Osorio, Lili Packer, Tadeusz Pajerski, William Parker, Oneil Parkes, Miller M. Parra, Derek L. Partee, Vasilios Parthenis, John Patino, Priscilla Payne, Richard J. Pearse, Lawrence Pearson, Gabriel Pena, Juan Carlos Pena, Juan B. Peralta, Oscar Perez, Maria Perez-Delgado, Lee Perlman, Robert Perniciaro, Vanessa Pero, Howard Perry, Christine Clausi Petosa, Adrian Pierce, Janusz Piersa, Michael Pignatelli, Lorenzo Pittman, Jozef Pogorzelski, Piotr Polak, Joseph Polidoro, Jan Pomichowski, Candelaria Porras, Raymond Pose, Juan Prada, Stanislaw Pszeniczny, Maria Puello, Manuel Puli, Dioselina Quintana, Joseph Racanelli, Stanislaw Radzieta, Juan Rakela, Arlene Ramery, Iris Ramirez, Nubia Ramirez, Ramiro Ramirez, Ramona Ramirez, William I. Ramirezy, Jagjewan Ramroop, Arlene Reddick, Dennis Reilly, Karen Reoch, Julio Repetto, Marian Retelski, Antonia Rivera, Jose A. Rivera, Minerva Rivera, Benjamin Rivers, Germano Riviera, Juan Carlos Roa, Kevin F. Robinson, Yvonne Robinson, Daniel Rodgers, Americo Rodriguez, Anibal Rodriguez, Ramiro Rodriguez, Rosemary Rodriguez, Witold Roginski, Josefina Rosado, Mark Roseman, Sam Roseman, Mark Rothman, Dragica Roy, Ignacy Rozanski, Steven Ruggiero, Joseph Russo, Eunicestine Rutledge, Surjit Saini, Yvonne Salaman, Joffre Salinas, Ralph Salomone, Demetrius Samadjopoulos, Richard Sammarco, Alex Anthony Sanchez, German Sanchez, Anthony Santa Maria, Felix Santana, Andrew M. Santeramo, Ruben Santos, Vincent Sarcone, Joseph Savoca, William Schmitt, Sylvia Schmitz, Raymond Schnarr, Robert Schnelle, Robert N. Schroh, William Schuchat, Peter Seeman, Jeffrey Scott Seide, Martha Sepulveda, Robert Serrone, James G. Service, Suvarna Shah, David Sharinn, James Sheehan, Jacek Sieka, Robert Sienkiewicz, Jose Siguachi, Rosa Siguencia, Walter Silverman, Dara Simon, Cheryl Simpkins, Barbara Singleton, Mark Sly, Terence J. Smith, Mieczyslaw Smoderek, Jose Sobral, Jonathan W. Socha, Jozef Sokolowski, Ramon Sola, Victor Solis, George Pope Solomon, David B. Sontz, Ramdial Sookhai, Pawel Stepniewicz, Barry Stevens, Brion Stewart, Paul Stutz, Dolores Suarez, Juan Suarez, Timothy Sullivan, Linda Suwidji, Paul Tacconi, Albert Talker, Christopher Tangney, Herminio Tapanes, Halina Tapia, Frank Taylor, Gregory Thomas, Paul Thyberg, John Toledo, Minerva Toro, Enoel Torres, Guillermo Torres, Nilda Torres, Lily Trofimoff, James B. Troncoso Jr., Minerva Tross, Richard Trotta, Iliana Troya, Omar Ulffe, Joseph M. Urso, Christopher Uszynski, Jose Santos Vaca, Rafael Valdez, Mario Valenzuela, Dr. Donald Valerino, Anthony Vangeli, Sonia Varela, Edwin Vargas, Veronica Vasquez-Salinas, Rafael A. Velasco, Liana Velasquez, George L. Velez, Noel Velez, Kimete Velic, Daniel Venditti, Frank Ventimiglia, Walter Villafuerte, Gregory Voce, Deborah Washington, Emanuel R. Weisgras, Wynelle Welch, Rose Wells, Scott Wetter, David Whalen, Laura Whickum,
June 8, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Grochow, Robert)
June 8, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Allen Grochow. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (kl)
June 8, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Peter C. Zaun, Emanuel R. Weisgras, Bryant Williamson, Stewart Wilkins, Scott Wetter, Gersham Williams, Deborah Washington, Rose Wells, Gregory Voce, Errol Wynter, Walter Villafuerte, Utjok Zaidan, Richard C. Williams, Wynelle Welch, Marva M. White, Joseph Wimmer, Daniel Venditti, Laura Whickum, Kimete Velic, Patricia Workman, David Whalen, Frank Ventimiglia added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Peter C. Zaun, Emanuel R. Weisgras, Bryant Williamson, Stewart Wilkins, Scott Wetter, Gersham Williams, Deborah Washington, Rose Wells, Gregory Voce, Errol Wynter, Walter Villafuerte, Utjok Zaidan, Richard C. Williams, Wynelle Welch, Marva M. White, Joseph Wimmer, Daniel Venditti, Laura Whickum, Kimete Velic, Patricia Workman, David Whalen, Frank Ventimiglia. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 8, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Noel Velez, Liana Velasquez, Rafael A. Velasco, George L. Velez added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Noel Velez, Liana Velasquez, Rafael A. Velasco, George L. Velez. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 8, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Joseph M. Urso, Sonia Varela, Rafael Valdez, Veronica Vasquez-Salinas, Omar Ulffe, Jose Santos Vaca, Iliana Troya, Richard Trotta, Edwin Vargas, Christopher Uszynski, Anthony Vangeli, James B. Troncoso Jr., Dr. Donald Valerino, Lily Trofimoff, Mario Valenzuela, Minerva Tross added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Joseph M. Urso, Sonia Varela, Rafael Valdez, Veronica Vasquez-Salinas, Omar Ulffe, Jose Santos Vaca, Iliana Troya, Richard Trotta, Edwin Vargas, Christopher Uszynski, Anthony Vangeli, James B. Troncoso Jr., Dr. Donald Valerino, Lily Trofimoff, Mario Valenzuela, Minerva Tross. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 8, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners John Toledo, Barry Stevens, Herminio Tapanes, Paul Tacconi, Minerva Toro, Dolores Suarez, Christopher Tangney, Pawel Stepniewicz, Paul Stutz, Ramdial Sookhai, Gregory Thomas, David B. Sontz, Paul Thyberg, Albert Talker, Brion Stewart, Guillermo Torres, Linda Suwidji, Halina Tapia, Nilda Torres, Victor Solis, Timothy Sullivan, Ramon Sola, Frank Taylor, Juan Suarez, Enoel Torres, George Pope Solomon added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Toledo, Barry Stevens, Herminio Tapanes, Paul Tacconi, Minerva Toro, Dolores Suarez, Christopher Tangney, Pawel Stepniewicz, Paul Stutz, Ramdial Sookhai, Gregory Thomas, David B. Sontz, Paul Thyberg, Albert Talker, Brion Stewart, Guillermo Torres, Linda Suwidji, Halina Tapia, Nilda Torres, Victor Solis, Timothy Sullivan, Ramon Sola, Frank Taylor, Juan Suarez, Enoel Torres, George Pope Solomon. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 8, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Terence J. Smith, Martha Sepulveda, Walter Silverman, Robert Sienkiewicz, Mieczyslaw Smoderek, Suvarna Shah, Rosa Siguencia, Jeffrey Scott Seide, James G. Service, Peter Seeman, Barbara Singleton, William Schuchat, Mark Sly, Jose Siguachi, Robert Serrone, Jonathan W. Socha, Jacek Sieka, Dara Simon, Jozef Sokolowski, Robert Schnelle, James Sheehan, Raymond Schnarr, Cheryl Simpkins, David Sharinn, Jose Sobral, Robert N. Schroh added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Terence J. Smith, Martha Sepulveda, Walter Silverman, Robert Sienkiewicz, Mieczyslaw Smoderek, Suvarna Shah, Rosa Siguencia, Jeffrey Scott Seide, James G. Service, Peter Seeman, Barbara Singleton, William Schuchat, Mark Sly, Jose Siguachi, Robert Serrone, Jonathan W. Socha, Jacek Sieka, Dara Simon, Jozef Sokolowski, Robert Schnelle, James Sheehan, Raymond Schnarr, Cheryl Simpkins, David Sharinn, Jose Sobral, Robert N. Schroh. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 8, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Alex Anthony Sanchez, Joseph Savoca, Felix Santana, Sylvia Schmitz, Richard Sammarco, Anthony Santa Maria, Demetrius Samadjopoulos, Ralph Salomone, William Schmitt, German Sanchez, Vincent Sarcone, Yvonne Salaman, Ruben Santos, Surjit Saini, Andrew M. Santeramo, Joffre Salinas added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alex Anthony Sanchez, Joseph Savoca, Felix Santana, Sylvia Schmitz, Richard Sammarco, Anthony Santa Maria, Demetrius Samadjopoulos, Ralph Salomone, William Schmitt, German Sanchez, Vincent Sarcone, Yvonne Salaman, Ruben Santos, Surjit Saini, Andrew M. Santeramo, Joffre Salinas. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 8, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Robert Allen Grochow. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
June 8, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Robert Allen Grochow. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (kl)
June 7, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Steven Ruggiero, Ignacy Rozanski, Eunicestine Rutledge, Joseph Russo added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Steven Ruggiero, Ignacy Rozanski, Eunicestine Rutledge, Joseph Russo. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 7, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Dragica Roy added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Dragica Roy. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 7, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Witold Roginski, Daniel Rodgers, Sam Roseman, Anibal Rodriguez, Mark Roseman, Rosemary Rodriguez, Kevin F. Robinson, Mark Rothman, Americo Rodriguez, Ramiro Rodriguez, Josefina Rosado added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Witold Roginski, Daniel Rodgers, Sam Roseman, Anibal Rodriguez, Mark Roseman, Rosemary Rodriguez, Kevin F. Robinson, Mark Rothman, Americo Rodriguez, Ramiro Rodriguez, Josefina Rosado. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 7, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Yvonne Robinson, Jose A. Rivera, Arlene Reddick, Juan Carlos Roa, Benjamin Rivers, Marian Retelski, Minerva Rivera, Julio Repetto, Jagjewan Ramroop, Germano Riviera, Karen Reoch, Dennis Reilly, Antonia Rivera added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Yvonne Robinson, Jose A. Rivera, Arlene Reddick, Juan Carlos Roa, Benjamin Rivers, Marian Retelski, Minerva Rivera, Julio Repetto, Jagjewan Ramroop, Germano Riviera, Karen Reoch, Dennis Reilly, Antonia Rivera. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 7, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Joseph Racanelli, Raymond Pose, Iris Ramirez, Stanislaw Radzieta, Nubia Ramirez, Jozef Pogorzelski, Dioselina Quintana, Maria Puello, Arlene Ramery, Candelaria Porras, Stanislaw Pszeniczny, Jan Pomichowski, Lorenzo Pittman, Ramona Ramirez, Manuel Puli, Ramiro Ramirez, Joseph Polidoro, William I. Ramirezy, Juan Rakela, Piotr Polak, Juan Prada added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Joseph Racanelli, Raymond Pose, Iris Ramirez, Stanislaw Radzieta, Nubia Ramirez, Jozef Pogorzelski, Dioselina Quintana, Maria Puello, Arlene Ramery, Candelaria Porras, Stanislaw Pszeniczny, Jan Pomichowski, Lorenzo Pittman, Ramona Ramirez, Manuel Puli, Ramiro Ramirez, Joseph Polidoro, William I. Ramirezy, Juan Rakela, Piotr Polak, Juan Prada. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 7, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Howard Perry, Oscar Perez, Michael Pignatelli, Vanessa Pero, Janusz Piersa, Robert Perniciaro, Juan B. Peralta, Lee Perlman, Maria Perez-Delgado, Adrian Pierce added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Howard Perry, Oscar Perez, Michael Pignatelli, Vanessa Pero, Janusz Piersa, Robert Perniciaro, Juan B. Peralta, Lee Perlman, Maria Perez-Delgado, Adrian Pierce. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 7, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Vasilios Parthenis, Tadeusz Pajerski, Wanda I. Ortiz, Emeka Nwigwe, Jan Niedziela, Walter R. O'Donnell, Ryszard Obiedzinski, Isioma Ogbue, Richard J. Pearse, William Parker, Guillermo Osorio, John Patino, Margaret Nasta, Derek L. Partee, Rosa Nunez, Miguel Nolasco, Juan Carlos Pena, Priscilla Payne, John Odia, Ronalda Nicholas-Frazier, Oneil Parkes, Kenrick Nisbett, Shedricka Nesbitt, Jose Naranjo, Patrick Okeefe, Matthew Norton, Lili Packer, Miller M. Parra, Gabriel Pena, Michael Oliva, Andrejz Nerc, Virginia Ortiz, Daniel O'Brien, William Neary, Ed Nigri, Lawrence Pearson added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Vasilios Parthenis, Tadeusz Pajerski, Wanda I. Ortiz, Emeka Nwigwe, Jan Niedziela, Walter R. O'Donnell, Ryszard Obiedzinski, Isioma Ogbue, Richard J. Pearse, William Parker, Guillermo Osorio, John Patino, Margaret Nasta, Derek L. Partee, Rosa Nunez, Miguel Nolasco, Juan Carlos Pena, Priscilla Payne, John Odia, Ronalda Nicholas-Frazier, Oneil Parkes, Kenrick Nisbett, Shedricka Nesbitt, Jose Naranjo, Patrick Okeefe, Matthew Norton, Lili Packer, Miller M. Parra, Gabriel Pena, Michael Oliva, Andrejz Nerc, Virginia Ortiz, Daniel O'Brien, William Neary, Ed Nigri, Lawrence Pearson. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 7, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Jerry Morales, Dominick M. Montalto Jr., Curtis Charles Mondesir, Ireneusz Mierzejewski, Carmen Mena, Barbara Minsky, Tadeusz Milek, Thomas Miraglia, Jose Morales Jr., Nino Montano, Alexis Monroe, Debbie Morales, Michael McPhillips, Joseph Montwaid, Hernan Munoz, William Myerwold, Doretha Middleton, John Mescall, Nicholas Moscato, Raymond Morales, Edgar Munoz, Elizabeth A. Miller, Thelmore Meeks, Debra Anne Monte, Tommy Mendez, John Napolitano, Rosa Medina, Kevin McPartland, Francisco Mite, Wojciech Michalik, Clara Montague, William Mulzet, Marlene Monteleone, Teresa Morrone, Robbill Mohammed, Phillip McQueen, Charles Murphy, William J. Moise Jr., Jerzy Muszkatel, Esperanza Munoz, Kenneth L. Murray, Michael Mulvaney, Russell Millar, Michael Thomas McPhillips, William R. Mendez, Jacqueline Morrison added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jerry Morales, Dominick M. Montalto Jr., Curtis Charles Mondesir, Ireneusz Mierzejewski, Carmen Mena, Barbara Minsky, Tadeusz Milek, Thomas Miraglia, Jose Morales Jr., Nino Montano, Alexis Monroe, Debbie Morales, Michael McPhillips, Joseph Montwaid, Hernan Munoz, William Myerwold, Doretha Middleton, John Mescall, Nicholas Moscato, Raymond Morales, Edgar Munoz, Elizabeth A. Miller, Thelmore Meeks, Debra Anne Monte, Tommy Mendez, John Napolitano, Rosa Medina, Kevin McPartland, Francisco Mite, Wojciech Michalik, Clara Montague, William Mulzet, Marlene Monteleone, Teresa Morrone, Robbill Mohammed, Phillip McQueen, Charles Murphy, William J. Moise Jr., Jerzy Muszkatel, Esperanza Munoz, Kenneth L. Murray, Michael Mulvaney, Russell Millar, Michael Thomas McPhillips, William R. Mendez, Jacqueline Morrison. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 7, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Thomas McHugh, Greg McDonald, Fain McKinney, Peter McGrath, Rickie McKie, Kristin McGrath, Joseph McDonald, Thomas McMahon, Ryan McGinty, Robert E. McFeeley, Albert McIntosh added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Thomas McHugh, Greg McDonald, Fain McKinney, Peter McGrath, Rickie McKie, Kristin McGrath, Joseph McDonald, Thomas McMahon, Ryan McGinty, Robert E. McFeeley, Albert McIntosh. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 7, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Ernest K. Matthews, Raul Martinez Sr., Doris Martinez, Marian Maksimiuk, Jean-Anne Mackrell, Zbigniew Mankiewicz, Hopeton Malcolm, Jose A. Manrique, Julio Mayorga, Luis Martinez-Nicolas, Susana Martinez, Piotr Matuszewski, Deborah Lupard, Diana C. Matthews, Igor J. Makar, Peter C. Maguire Jr., Todd Mayer, Robert Mandell, Daniel Mackey, Nelson Marty, Jozef Madej, Alexander Macias, Jaroslaw Ludwiczak, Janusz Marcinkowski, Piotr Majewski, Geraldo Martinez, Thomas Marucheau, James E. McCullough, Maria Marino, Volodymyr Lyseyko, Carmen Marte, Thomas Maloney, William Lutter, Joseph Maddaloni, Robert McAllister added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ernest K. Matthews, Raul Martinez Sr., Doris Martinez, Marian Maksimiuk, Jean-Anne Mackrell, Zbigniew Mankiewicz, Hopeton Malcolm, Jose A. Manrique, Julio Mayorga, Luis Martinez-Nicolas, Susana Martinez, Piotr Matuszewski, Deborah Lupard, Diana C. Matthews, Igor J. Makar, Peter C. Maguire Jr., Todd Mayer, Robert Mandell, Daniel Mackey, Nelson Marty, Jozef Madej, Alexander Macias, Jaroslaw Ludwiczak, Janusz Marcinkowski, Piotr Majewski, Geraldo Martinez, Thomas Marucheau, James E. McCullough, Maria Marino, Volodymyr Lyseyko, Carmen Marte, Thomas Maloney, William Lutter, Joseph Maddaloni, Robert McAllister. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 7, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Pascual Llibri, Joseph Lewis, Maxine Londner, Julio C. Lliguicota, Luz Stella Lopez, Antoni Lelek, Jose Llaverias, Marian A. Lizzio, Edward Lobue, Diane Lewis, Maritza Liriano, David Levy, Darryl Lee, Rance Louallen, Gloria Llanes, Jason B. Lowenfeld, Marianne Leto, Henry Lozano, Nicolas Loaiza, Richard Lennon, Mark Libecci added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Pascual Llibri, Joseph Lewis, Maxine Londner, Julio C. Lliguicota, Luz Stella Lopez, Antoni Lelek, Jose Llaverias, Marian A. Lizzio, Edward Lobue, Diane Lewis, Maritza Liriano, David Levy, Darryl Lee, Rance Louallen, Gloria Llanes, Jason B. Lowenfeld, Marianne Leto, Henry Lozano, Nicolas Loaiza, Richard Lennon, Mark Libecci. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 7, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Susan Lawrence, Susan Latham, Marian Kuczaj, Jan Kozinski, Alexander Landi, Zygmunt Kwiatkowski, Zdzislaw Langier, John H. Lavelle, David Kogan, Zbigniew Kucharski, Jozef Z. Kruczak, George Lamoreaux, Tadeusz Kowalewski, Fred J. Krines, Howard Kosta, Quentin Kirkland, Frances LaPointe, Stanislaw Kubrak, Valeriy Lavruk, Tadeusz Larwa, Linus Korieocha, Andrzej Lasica, Sorel LaFaurie, William Otto Koladzyn, Amy Krakow added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Susan Lawrence, Susan Latham, Marian Kuczaj, Jan Kozinski, Alexander Landi, Zygmunt Kwiatkowski, Zdzislaw Langier, John H. Lavelle, David Kogan, Zbigniew Kucharski, Jozef Z. Kruczak, George Lamoreaux, Tadeusz Kowalewski, Fred J. Krines, Howard Kosta, Quentin Kirkland, Frances LaPointe, Stanislaw Kubrak, Valeriy Lavruk, Tadeusz Larwa, Linus Korieocha, Andrzej Lasica, Sorel LaFaurie, William Otto Koladzyn, Amy Krakow. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 7, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Richard Kiggins, Keith Kaplan, Robert Kabakoff, James T. Keller, Stanislaw Karpierz, Mark S. Kelly, Thomas F. King, Eugeniusz Jastrzebowski, Waldemar Kapkowski, Tadeusz Kajda, Joyce Keller, Teresa Jurado, Samuel Kahan, Benjamin Jones, John Jarvis, John L. Kemp, George Kaperonis, Erwin Kirbach, Brian Kemp, Chiemene Jenkins, Volodymyr Khomik, Jeffrey Kegler, James J. Jenkins, Jerzy Kadziela added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Richard Kiggins, Keith Kaplan, Robert Kabakoff, James T. Keller, Stanislaw Karpierz, Mark S. Kelly, Thomas F. King, Eugeniusz Jastrzebowski, Waldemar Kapkowski, Tadeusz Kajda, Joyce Keller, Teresa Jurado, Samuel Kahan, Benjamin Jones, John Jarvis, John L. Kemp, George Kaperonis, Erwin Kirbach, Brian Kemp, Chiemene Jenkins, Volodymyr Khomik, Jeffrey Kegler, James J. Jenkins, Jerzy Kadziela. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 7, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Maria Hernandez, Rosaria J. Heide, Patrick Hansen, Jerimiah Jamison, Jennifer A. Jacovino, John Hickman, Deveret M. Howell, Ruth Hermosilla, Gustavo Iturralde, Michael Hunt, Sharon Jacobs, Czeslaw Jagiello, Julie Harvey, Thomas Harden, Kirk Hohensheldt, Carlos L. Herrera, Mohamed Jalloh, Gary Iorio, Mary Ellen Hurd-Shy, Matthew Henderson, Rose Harris, Orlando Hernandez added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maria Hernandez, Rosaria J. Heide, Patrick Hansen, Jerimiah Jamison, Jennifer A. Jacovino, John Hickman, Deveret M. Howell, Ruth Hermosilla, Gustavo Iturralde, Michael Hunt, Sharon Jacobs, Czeslaw Jagiello, Julie Harvey, Thomas Harden, Kirk Hohensheldt, Carlos L. Herrera, Mohamed Jalloh, Gary Iorio, Mary Ellen Hurd-Shy, Matthew Henderson, Rose Harris, Orlando Hernandez. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 7, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Henryk Grabowski, John P. Gorea Jr., Peter Giordano, Diovani Gutierrez, Jerkeida R. Grant, Alfonza Green, Alexander Gorelik, Mark Groblewski, Rose E. Gribben, Edward Groger, Michael Hafey, Gag Gordova, Carlos Raul Gomez, Ann Grant, Marcin Grabowski, Anthony Hall, Yvette Griffins, Allan Grier, Ryszard Gorecki, Milton Gordon, Frank Gorglione added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Henryk Grabowski, John P. Gorea Jr., Peter Giordano, Diovani Gutierrez, Jerkeida R. Grant, Alfonza Green, Alexander Gorelik, Mark Groblewski, Rose E. Gribben, Edward Groger, Michael Hafey, Gag Gordova, Carlos Raul Gomez, Ann Grant, Marcin Grabowski, Anthony Hall, Yvette Griffins, Allan Grier, Ryszard Gorecki, Milton Gordon, Frank Gorglione. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 7, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners George Gaffney, Kathy Gibbs, Lucyna Foremska, Eugene Gentile, Jose Emilio Gaviria, Simone Gallo, Luis B. Garcia, Jozef Galazka, Delicia Gary, Louis Garcia, Frank Gianni, Mozella Gatewood, Rabiah Gaynor, Mark Gado, Israel Gil, Joseph P. Giamportone, Enrico Frase, Manuel Garcia, Thomas Galligan, Mark Gendel, Allen Charles Garner, Peter A. Gargano, Jadwiga Galazka, Janina Frelas, Pamela Gallichio added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by George Gaffney, Kathy Gibbs, Lucyna Foremska, Eugene Gentile, Jose Emilio Gaviria, Simone Gallo, Luis B. Garcia, Jozef Galazka, Delicia Gary, Louis Garcia, Frank Gianni, Mozella Gatewood, Rabiah Gaynor, Mark Gado, Israel Gil, Joseph P. Giamportone, Enrico Frase, Manuel Garcia, Thomas Galligan, Mark Gendel, Allen Charles Garner, Peter A. Gargano, Jadwiga Galazka, Janina Frelas, Pamela Gallichio. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 7, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Leverne Floyd, Manuel Foranoce, Maria Fajardo, Ana Estrella, Joseph Fitzgerald, Erika Espinosa, Jozef Filipkowski, Angel Figueroa, Stanislaw S. Faltynowicz, Joanne Felicetta, Royal Eversley, Stanislaw Fic, Anita Ferdinand, Vincent Fiorenza, Teodulo Fiesta, Ira Fogelgaren, Melinda Figueroa, Alonso Espinoza, Robert Fitzpatrick, Richard Filippazzo, Jorge Espinoza, Donna A. Fontana, Joan M. Farrell, William Fallon, Milagros Figueroa, Milagros Fernandez, Maria Fernanda Garcia, Colombina Estrella, Rosa Espinoza, Lena Fabian-Slim added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Leverne Floyd, Manuel Foranoce, Maria Fajardo, Ana Estrella, Joseph Fitzgerald, Erika Espinosa, Jozef Filipkowski, Angel Figueroa, Stanislaw S. Faltynowicz, Joanne Felicetta, Royal Eversley, Stanislaw Fic, Anita Ferdinand, Vincent Fiorenza, Teodulo Fiesta, Ira Fogelgaren, Melinda Figueroa, Alonso Espinoza, Robert Fitzpatrick, Richard Filippazzo, Jorge Espinoza, Donna A. Fontana, Joan M. Farrell, William Fallon, Milagros Figueroa, Milagros Fernandez, Maria Fernanda Garcia, Colombina Estrella, Rosa Espinoza, Lena Fabian-Slim. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 7, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Maria Encarnacion, Stanislaw Dziadezykowski, Louis Duclerc, Wandalesca Espinal, George Echebiri, Rudolph Dyer, Jose Dumet, Karen Eremita, Linda Eaton-Lewis, Sergiu Dumitrache, Laurie Edwards added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maria Encarnacion, Stanislaw Dziadezykowski, Louis Duclerc, Wandalesca Espinal, George Echebiri, Rudolph Dyer, Jose Dumet, Karen Eremita, Linda Eaton-Lewis, Sergiu Dumitrache, Laurie Edwards. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 6, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners James Doran, Peter Donahue, Denis Dooley, Kathleen Donavon, James Donohue added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by James Doran, Peter Donahue, Denis Dooley, Kathleen Donavon, James Donohue. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 6, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Jozef Czubat, John J. Dalton, Michael Cioffi, Miguel Chung, Mathew Cusumano, Odessa Chin, Curtis Crowe, Francisco Cordova, Mark Clarke-Milton, Jose Collado, Henryk Ciborowski, Patrick Colossi, Yudelka Collado, Muriel Cunningham, Castrenze DiCarlo, Robert Conti, Jerzy Czypinisz, Leonard Desilva, Galo Cordova, Charles DeMarco, Neville Chung, Zbigniew Czachurski, Patrick Crowley, Frank Degirolamo, Boguslaw Dlugosz, Dariusz Chojnowski, Alex Daikoku, Robert Dinnen, William Dolan, Christine Clausi Petosa, Gerard Ciquera, Donna DeSoto, Dallas Cromwell, Jan Dobrowolski, Richard Delfino, Waldemar Directie, John Dobies, Rosa Diaz Alvarez, Stephen M. Dietz, Gerald Colon, Maritza Colon, Elzbieta Ciborowska, Franciszek Chojnowski, Romuald Cieslak, Barbara Demarco added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jozef Czubat, John J. Dalton, Michael Cioffi, Miguel Chung, Mathew Cusumano, Odessa Chin, Curtis Crowe, Francisco Cordova, Mark Clarke-Milton, Jose Collado, Henryk Ciborowski, Patrick Colossi, Yudelka Collado, Muriel Cunningham, Castrenze DiCarlo, Robert Conti, Jerzy Czypinisz, Leonard Desilva, Galo Cordova, Charles DeMarco, Neville Chung, Zbigniew Czachurski, Patrick Crowley, Frank Degirolamo, Boguslaw Dlugosz, Dariusz Chojnowski, Alex Daikoku, Robert Dinnen, William Dolan, Christine Clausi Petosa, Gerard Ciquera, Donna DeSoto, Dallas Cromwell, Jan Dobrowolski, Richard Delfino, Waldemar Directie, John Dobies, Rosa Diaz Alvarez, Stephen M. Dietz, Gerald Colon, Maritza Colon, Elzbieta Ciborowska, Franciszek Chojnowski, Romuald Cieslak, Barbara Demarco. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 6, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Jorge Campoverde, Carlos Cardenas, Leonardo Cano, Cindy Cheung, Coretta Callender-Faulk, Manuel Checo, Ana Camacho, Maria Chainoha, Raymond Cassar, Tokeato Carter, James Carriel, Dennis Cassidy, Sonja Checinski, Howard Caplan, Thomas Joseph Cera, Hector Castro, Joseph Chierchio, Gerome Cerverizzo, Joseph A. Cella, Robert S. Chapman, Gisel Castro, Stephanie Campbell, Carrie Cantey, Sonia M. Capon added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jorge Campoverde, Carlos Cardenas, Leonardo Cano, Cindy Cheung, Coretta Callender-Faulk, Manuel Checo, Ana Camacho, Maria Chainoha, Raymond Cassar, Tokeato Carter, James Carriel, Dennis Cassidy, Sonja Checinski, Howard Caplan, Thomas Joseph Cera, Hector Castro, Joseph Chierchio, Gerome Cerverizzo, Joseph A. Cella, Robert S. Chapman, Gisel Castro, Stephanie Campbell, Carrie Cantey, Sonia M. Capon. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 6, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Barbara Boursiquot, Paul Brobeck, Sheila Boyette, Clay Calle, John Bitsko, Felix Calle, Gustavo Blandon, Heather Cabrera, Michael Browne, Alan Brown, Michal Brodacki, Heather Browne-Dee, Luis Calle, Ernestine Branch, Robert A. Burmeister, Barry Bryan, Stanislaw Burzynski, Esteban Bueno, Angela Calhoun, Phillip R. Bryant, Robert Park Borchert, Michelle Bracey, Gwendolyn Brandt added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Barbara Boursiquot, Paul Brobeck, Sheila Boyette, Clay Calle, John Bitsko, Felix Calle, Gustavo Blandon, Heather Cabrera, Michael Browne, Alan Brown, Michal Brodacki, Heather Browne-Dee, Luis Calle, Ernestine Branch, Robert A. Burmeister, Barry Bryan, Stanislaw Burzynski, Esteban Bueno, Angela Calhoun, Phillip R. Bryant, Robert Park Borchert, Michelle Bracey, Gwendolyn Brandt. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 6, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Leszek Bieniek, Joseph Benbow, Claudia S. Bernstein, Frances Benjamin, Nathan Bednarsh, Jose Luis Bello, Miroslaw Binko, Yuriy Bilonozhenko, Michelle Berti, Rhoda Berger, Joseph Belmonte, Trevor Berridge, Jeffrey Bernstein, Dariusz Bienduga, Martha Bermudez, Richard F. Bergmann added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Leszek Bieniek, Joseph Benbow, Claudia S. Bernstein, Frances Benjamin, Nathan Bednarsh, Jose Luis Bello, Miroslaw Binko, Yuriy Bilonozhenko, Michelle Berti, Rhoda Berger, Joseph Belmonte, Trevor Berridge, Jeffrey Bernstein, Dariusz Bienduga, Martha Bermudez, Richard F. Bergmann. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 6, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Richard Barnett, Jose A. Batista, Michael Barrett, Fernando Baracaldo, Wladyslaw Barszcz, Stanley Becton, Richard Baker, Gennadiy Barykin, Arina Bakhareva, Michael Bartone added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Richard Barnett, Jose A. Batista, Michael Barrett, Fernando Baracaldo, Wladyslaw Barszcz, Stanley Becton, Richard Baker, Gennadiy Barykin, Arina Bakhareva, Michael Bartone. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 6, 2017 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Andrzej Badzio, Aleksander Bajguz added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Andrzej Badzio, Aleksander Bajguz. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aluko Mose, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Neil Attardi, Wilmer Andrade, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Barry Aissatou, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Hernan Alvarez.(Grochow, Robert)
June 6, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13748526)Document filed by Hernan Alvarez, Blanche Alejandro, Jan Bachusz, Wilmer Andrade, Vladimir Akoulov, Howard Abrams, Aluko Mose, Bibiana Cristina Andrade, Aldo Antonio, Neil Attardi, Arnaldo Almonte, Tony Agyman, Telma Alvarado, Barry Aissatou.(Grochow, Robert)
June 6, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Allen Grochow to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 6/12/2017. (jvs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrams et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanche Alejandro
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aldo Antonio
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Attardi
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Aissatou
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Bachusz
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telma Alvarado
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hernan Alvarez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Abrams
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aluko Mose
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmer Andrade
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bibiana Cristina Andrade
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnaldo Almonte
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir Akoulov
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Agyman
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Hohensheldt
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Sobral
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Latham
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter C. Zaun
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerzy Czypinisz
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kogan
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Calle
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter A. Gargano
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Ramirez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Berti
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis B. Garcia
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Cardenas
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hunt
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tadeusz Milek
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean-Anne Mackrell
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Kemp
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Czeslaw Jagiello
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Maloney
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudolph Dyer
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anibal Rodriguez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Wimmer
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Martinez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip R. Bryant
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arina Bakhareva
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Repetto
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Bryan
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dobies
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pignatelli
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard C. Williams
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Roa
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanislaw Pszeniczny
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter R. O'Donnell
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piotr Matuszewski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Maddaloni
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrico Frase
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Morales
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoni Lelek
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wynelle Welch
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio C. Lliguicota
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Garcia
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Ulffe
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Brandt
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Iturralde
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Igor J. Makar
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Lupard
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gisel Castro
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Millar
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tadeusz Kowalewski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Burmeister
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George L. Velez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jozef Galazka
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zbigniew Czachurski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iliana Troya
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Emilio Gaviria
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickie McKie
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Morrone
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Lee
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanislaw S. Faltynowicz
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tokeato Carter
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Witold Roginski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Manrique
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herminio Tapanes
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Castro
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Singleton
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Ciquera
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Dumet
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Blandon
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestine Branch
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanislaw Burzynski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Sola
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Browne
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shedricka Nesbitt
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Prada
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chiemene Jenkins
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Estrella
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan B. Peralta
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Sly
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritza Colon
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Dobrowolski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucyna Foremska
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimete Velic
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Rakela
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T. Keller
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas McMahon
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sharinn
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Galligan
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. McCullough
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Baker
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muriel Cunningham
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Monteleone
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenrick Nisbett
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanislaw Dziadezykowski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Ventimiglia
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Garcia
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candelaria Porras
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Talker
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halina Tapia
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Rodriguez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Munoz
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Racanelli
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Giordano
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Miraglia
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Seeman
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R. Mendez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanislaw Karpierz
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: German Sanchez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbill Mohammed
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Fajardo
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Campbell
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin McGrath
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Diaz Alvarez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Mena
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hafey
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Neary
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrzej Lasica
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dariusz Bienduga
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Schnelle
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances LaPointe
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cioffi
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Valdez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Donahue
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Harden
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Charles Garner
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Grier
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Schuchat
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Murphy
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ireneusz Mierzejewski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Samadjopoulos
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Grant
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Chainoha
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert McIntosh
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valeriy Lavruk
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Pearse
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred J. Krines
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delicia Gary
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Whickum
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Eremita
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dioselina Quintana
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gersham Williams
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena Fabian-Slim
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Varela
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Bednarsh
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Suwidji
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Schmitz
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Sarcone
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Donavon
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Myerwold
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Perniciaro
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Fallon
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jozef Madej
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A. Cella
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bartone
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Salaman
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Uszynski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Calle
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jadwiga Galazka
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Osorio
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Cassidy
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leverne Floyd
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick M. Montalto Jr.
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Gallichio
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Espinoza
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew M. Santeramo
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonardo Cano
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Lamoreaux
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Martinez Sr.
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dinnen
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonza Green
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McPhillips
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen M. Dietz
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhoda Berger
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henryk Grabowski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Siguachi
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Moise Jr.
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Felicetta
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Camacho
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Torres
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Collado
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Montague
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldo Martinez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Becton
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Macias
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minerva Rivera
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Schnarr
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Boyette
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lawrence
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerome Cerverizzo
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Harris
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erwin Kirbach
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dara Simon
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Perry
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna DeSoto
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Montwaid
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Pittman
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sheehan
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Ramery
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Stella Lopez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jozef Z. Kruczak
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isioma Ogbue
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zygmunt Kwiatkowski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Workman
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mescall
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Duclerc
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Lozano
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Echebiri
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James G. Service
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia S. Bernstein
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mieczyslaw Smoderek
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Schmitt
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Parker
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jagjewan Ramroop
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Belmonte
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Stevens
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Pierce
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek L. Partee
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow