Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado v. Bank of Montreal et al

Plaintiff: Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado
Defendant: HSBC Bank Canada, RBC Dominion Securities Inc., National Bank Financial Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, Merrill Lynch Canada Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Bank of Montreal, The Bank of Nova Scotia, National Bank of Canada, Bank of America Merrill Lynch, BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Toronto-Dominion Bank, TD Securities Inc., National Bank of Canada Financial Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, CIBC World Markets Corp., Scotia Capital Inc., HSBC North America Holdings Inc., CIBC World Markets, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, BMO Financial Corp., Deutsche Bank Securities Limited, Bank Of America Corporation, Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, HSBC USA Inc., HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00342
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Sarah Netburn
Referring Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Filing 149 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #148 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove Lee J. Lefkowitz's appearance from the docket and name from the ECF distribution list. Attorney Lee Jason Lefkowitz terminated (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/15/2019) (cf) Modified on 5/15/2019 (cf).
May 15, 2019 Filing 148 MOTION for Lee J. Lefkowitz to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado.(Briganti, Vincent)
April 12, 2019 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #147 Notice of Appeal, filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
April 12, 2019 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #147 Notice of Appeal,. (tp)
April 11, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #145 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, #146 Clerk's Judgment,,,,,,. Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16676471. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Briganti, Vincent)
March 14, 2019 Filing 146 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #145 Order on Motion to Dismiss in favor of BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Financial Corp., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Merrill Lynch, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of Montreal, CIBC World Markets Corp., CIBC World Markets, Inc., Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Limited, HSBC Bank Canada, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC USA Inc., Merrill Lynch Canada Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, National Bank Financial Inc., National Bank of Canada, National Bank of Canada Financial Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Canada, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Scotia Capital Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Inc., The Bank of Nova Scotia, Toronto- Dominion Bank against Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated March 14, 2019, the foreign Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is GRANTED and Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTEDwith respect to Plaintiff's Sherman Act, CEA, and RICO claims. Plaintiff's state law claims are dismissed without prejudice to renewal in state court; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 3/14/2019) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal)(km)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #113 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated above, Foreign Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is GRANTED and Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiff's Sherman Act, CEA, and RICO claims. Plaintiff's state law claims are dismissed without prejudice to renewal in state court. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 113 and close the case. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/14/2019) (cf) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #143 Proposed Order for Withdrawal of Attorney filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Limited, Deutsche Bank AG. ENDORSEMENT: The motion for Moses Silverman to withdraw as counsel for Defendants Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., and Deutsche Bank Securities Limited is granted. (Attorney Moses Silverman terminated.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 11/20/2018) (ras)
November 16, 2018 Filing 143 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Limited. (Silverman, Moses)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER denying #133 Letter Motion for Oral Argument. DENIED. The Court will resolve the motion on the papers. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/18/2018) (jca)
October 11, 2018 Filing 141 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of Montreal, CIBC World Markets, Inc., Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Limited, HSBC Bank Canada, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, Merrill Lynch Canada Inc., National Bank Financial Inc., National Bank of Canada, RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Canada, Scotia Capital Inc., TD Securities Inc., The Bank of Nova Scotia, Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Davis, Harry)
October 11, 2018 Filing 140 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Financial Corp., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of Montreal. (Hakki, Adam)
October 10, 2018 Filing 139 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Paul DeFranco on behalf of National Bank Financial Inc., National Bank of Canada, National Bank of Canada Financial Inc.. (DeFranco, Thomas)
September 11, 2018 Filing 138 DECLARATION of Roland R. St. Louis, III in Opposition re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(St. Louis, Roland)
September 11, 2018 Filing 137 DECLARATION of J. Scott Simon in Opposition re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Briganti, Vincent)
September 11, 2018 Filing 136 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A)(Briganti, Vincent)
September 11, 2018 Filing 135 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Briganti, Vincent)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #107 Motion for Ryan A. Shores to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
July 13, 2018 Filing 133 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument re: #113 Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Adam S. Hakki dated July 13, 2018. Document filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Financial Corp., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of Montreal.(Hakki, Adam)
July 13, 2018 Filing 132 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Financial Corp., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of Montreal, CIBC World Markets Corp., CIBC World Markets, Inc., Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Limited, HSBC Bank Canada, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC USA Inc., Merrill Lynch Canada Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, National Bank Financial Inc., National Bank of Canada, National Bank of Canada Financial Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Canada, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Scotia Capital Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Inc., The Bank of Nova Scotia, Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Hakki, Adam)
July 13, 2018 Filing 131 DECLARATION of Moti Jungreis in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by TD Securities Inc., Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 130 DECLARATION of Pruyn Haskins in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Scotia Capital Inc.. (Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 129 DECLARATION of Fredrik Nilsson in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by The Bank of Nova Scotia. (Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 128 DECLARATION of Paul Serritella in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Canada. (Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 127 DECLARATION of Brian A. Davis in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by National Bank Financial Inc.. (Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 126 DECLARATION of Denis Girouard in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by National Bank of Canada. (Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 125 DECLARATION of Bruno Trasolini in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Merrill Lynch Canada Inc.. (Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 124 DECLARATION of Jason R. Henderson in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by HSBC Bank Canada. (Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 123 DECLARATION of Gavin A. Francis in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC. (Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 122 DECLARATION of Tim Brown in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by HSBC Bank PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 121 DECLARATION of Karen Pisarczyk in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by HSBC Holdings PLC. (Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 120 DECLARATION of David Gynn in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Limited. (Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 119 DECLARATION of Kristen Ciccimarra in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 118 DECLARATION of Ian Matthews in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by CIBC World Markets, Inc.. (Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 117 DECLARATION of Ian Matthews in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce. (Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 116 DECLARATION of Chris Taves in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc.. (Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Chris Taves in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Bank of Montreal. (Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss . for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Document filed by BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of Montreal, CIBC World Markets, Inc., Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Limited, HSBC Bank Canada, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, Merrill Lynch Canada Inc., National Bank Financial Inc., National Bank of Canada, RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Canada, Scotia Capital Inc., TD Securities Inc., The Bank of Nova Scotia, Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 113 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Financial Corp., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Merrill Lynch, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of Montreal, CIBC World Markets Corp., CIBC World Markets, Inc., Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Limited, HSBC Bank Canada, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC USA Inc., Merrill Lynch Canada Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, National Bank Financial Inc., National Bank of Canada, National Bank of Canada Financial Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Canada, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Scotia Capital Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Inc., The Bank of Nova Scotia, Toronto-Dominion Bank.(Davis, Harry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 112 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate BANA Holding Corp., Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation for Bank of America, N.A.; Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. Document filed by Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated.(Seshens, Dana)
July 12, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Gabor Mehes on behalf of Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Merrill Lynch Canada Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Mehes, Adam)
July 12, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sheila Ruby Adams on behalf of Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Merrill Lynch Canada Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Adams, Sheila)
July 5, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/11/2018 Replies due by 10/11/2018. (cf)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #108 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. Motions due by 7/13/2018. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/5/2018) (cf)
July 3, 2018 Filing 108 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Adam S. Hakki dated July 3, 2018. Document filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Financial Corp., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of Montreal.(Hakki, Adam)
July 3, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #107 MOTION for Ryan A. Shores to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
July 3, 2018 Filing 107 MOTION for Ryan A. Shores to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee of $200.00 paid, receipt no. 0208-15281061. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Financial Corp., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of Montreal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan A. Shores, #2 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Shores, Ryan) Modified on 7/3/2018 (jc).
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #105 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. The parties' opening and opposition memoranda of law shall not exceed 60 pages. Defendants' reply memorandum of law shall not exceed 30 pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/2/2018) (anc)
June 28, 2018 Filing 105 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Adam S. Hakki dated June 28, 2018. Document filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Financial Corp., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of Montreal.(Hakki, Adam)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #103 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew John Acocella terminated. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
June 6, 2018 Filing 103 MOTION for Matthew Acocella to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado.(Acocella, Matthew)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #100 Motion for Colleen Cleary to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #99 Motion for Carl Hammarskjold to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
June 4, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #99 MOTION for Carl Hammarskjold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15152197. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #100 MOTION for Colleen Cleary to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15152268. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The documents have been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
June 4, 2018 Filing 100 MOTION for Colleen Cleary to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15152268. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cleary, Colleen)
June 4, 2018 Filing 99 MOTION for Carl Hammarskjold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15152197. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammarskjold, Carl)
May 22, 2018 Filing 98 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Jessica Moy. Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Seaver, Todd)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER APPOINTING LOWEY DANNENBERG, P.C. AS INTERIM LEAD CLASS COUNSEL AND ESTABLISHING PLAINTIFF'S EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE: granting #78 Motion to Appoint Counsel. IT IS HEREBY THEREFORE ORDERED that: Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 23(g)(3), the Court designates Lowey Dannenberg as interim lead class counsel. An Executive Committee comprised of Lowey Dannenberg and Berman Tabacco shall be established and maintained to assist interim lead class counsel. Lowey Dannenberg shall be the chair of this committee. The parties may make an application seeking appropriate relief if/when a Subsequent Related Action is filed, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/8/2018) (ap)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters of April 20, 2018, and May 4, 2018, the Court sets the following schedule governing the defendants' motion to dismiss: The defendants' joint motion to dismiss is due Friday, July 6, 2018. The plaintiff's opposition is due Tuesday, September 4, 2018. The defendants' joint reply in further support of their motion to dismiss is due Thursday, October 4, 2018. The parties are ORDERED to follow Judge Torres's Individual Rule III(D) regarding page limits. The parties may seek leave to file memoranda of law in excess of those limits through letter-motion addressed to Judge Torres. The conference currently scheduled for Thursday, May 10, 2018, is ADJOURNED sine die. (Motions due by 7/6/2018. Responses due by 9/4/2018. Replies due by 10/4/2018.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/8/2018) (ap) Modified on 5/9/2018 (ap). Modified on 5/10/2018 (ap).
May 4, 2018 Filing 95 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Vincent Briganti dated May 4, 2018 re: Plaintiff's Letter in Opposition to Defendants' April 20, 2018 Request for Leave of Court to File Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado.(Briganti, Vincent)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to strike from the docket the Court's order dated May 3, 2018, ECF No. 92, setting a briefing schedule for Defendants' motion to dismiss. The briefing schedule set in that order is no longer in effect Pursuant to the order of the Honorable Sarah Netburn dated April 3, 2018, ECF No. 80, Plaintiff's response to Defendants' pre-motion letter is due today, May 4, 2018, and the parties shall appear for a conference before Judge Netburn on May 10, 2018. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/4/2018) (cf)
May 4, 2018 Filing 93 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Harry S. Davis dated May 4, 2018 re: requesting modification of the schedule. Document filed by National Bank Financial Inc., National Bank of Canada, National Bank of Canada Financial Inc..(Davis, Harry)
May 3, 2018 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 92 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #94 Order Striking Document from Record. (cf)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #90 Motion for Julia C. Webb to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
April 23, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #90 MOTION for Julia C. Webb to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14974920. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
April 23, 2018 Filing 90 MOTION for Julia C. Webb to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14974920. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by HSBC Bank Canada, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Webb, Julia)
April 20, 2018 Filing 89 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Adam S. Hakki dated April 20, 2018 re: On Behalf of All Defendants to Request Leave of Court to File Motions to Dismiss under Rules 12(b)(1), (2) and (6) of the Federal Rules. Document filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Financial Corp., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of Montreal.(Hakki, Adam)
April 20, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Steel Mishkin on behalf of Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Merrill Lynch Canada Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Mishkin, Paul)
April 20, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dana Meredith Seshens on behalf of Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Merrill Lynch Canada Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Seshens, Dana)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #85 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Suzanne Skinner Forster terminated. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
April 19, 2018 Filing 85 MOTION for Suzanne S. Forster to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Financial Corp., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of Montreal. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Forster, Suzanne)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Motion for J. Matthew Goodin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
April 17, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #83 MOTION for J. Matthew Goodin to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for Newly-Added Defendants. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14952717. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.>. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
April 17, 2018 Filing 83 MOTION for J. Matthew Goodin to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for Newly-Added Defendants. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14952717. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodin, James)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #81 Motion for Jessica Moy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
April 9, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #81 MOTION for Jessica Moy to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Fire > Police Pension Association of Colorado. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14912914. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office s. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 6, 2018 Filing 81 MOTION for Jessica Moy to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14912914. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moy, Jessica)
April 3, 2018 Filing 80 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #77 Letter, filed by TD Securities (USA) LLC, Toronto-Dominion Bank, TD Securities Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' proposed schedule is adopted in part. Defendants shall file a pre-motion letter concerning any motion to dismiss by April 20, 2018. Plaintiff's letter in response will be due by May 4, 2018. A conference shall be held to discuss these letters on Thursday, May 10, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/3/2018) (ap) Modified on 4/9/2018 (jnm).
March 28, 2018 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #78 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg, P.C. as Interim Lead Counsel. . Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Briganti, Vincent)
March 28, 2018 Filing 78 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg, P.C. as Interim Lead Counsel. Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Briganti, Vincent)
March 26, 2018 Filing 77 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from David Sapir Lesser dated March 26, 2018 re: Proposed Schedule Governing Amendment of the Complaint and Service of the Remaining Defendants. Document filed by TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Inc., Toronto-Dominion Bank.(Lesser, David)
March 26, 2018 Filing 76 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC USA Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (vf)
March 22, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew John Acocella on behalf of Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Acocella, Matthew)
March 20, 2018 Filing 74 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of America Corporation; Bank of America, N.A.; Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated; HSBC Bank USA, N.A.; HSBC USA Inc., re: #73 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Briganti, Vincent)
March 20, 2018 Filing 73 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,, against BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Financial Corp., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of Montreal, CIBC World Markets Corp., CIBC World Markets, Inc., Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Limited, HSBC Bank Canada, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Canada Inc., National Bank Financial Inc., National Bank of Canada, National Bank of Canada Financial Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Canada, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Scotia Capital Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Inc., The Bank of Nova Scotia, Toronto-Dominion Bank, Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC USA Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Briganti, Vincent)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Motion for William E. Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
March 12, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #71 MOTION for William E. Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 12, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION for William E. Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CIBC World Markets Corp., CIBC World Markets, Inc., Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William E. Walsh, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, William)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Stephen J. Senderowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
March 8, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #69 MOTION for William E. Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14782360. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
March 7, 2018 Filing 69 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for William E. Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14782360. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CIBC World Markets Corp., CIBC World Markets, Inc., Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, William) Modified on 3/8/2018 (wb).
March 6, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #68 MOTION for Stephen J. Senderowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14773036. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 5, 2018 Filing 68 MOTION for Stephen J. Senderowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14773036. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CIBC World Markets Corp., CIBC World Markets, Inc., Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephen J. Senderowitz in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Senderowitz, Stephen) Modified on 3/6/2018 (jc). Modified on 3/6/2018 (wb).
March 2, 2018 Filing 67 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce for CIBC World Markets Corp., CIBC World Markets, Inc.. Document filed by CIBC World Markets Corp., CIBC World Markets, Inc..(Hauser, Sandra)
March 2, 2018 Filing 66 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce.(Hauser, Sandra)
March 2, 2018 Filing 65 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent National Bank of Canada, Corporate Parent FMI Acquisition Inc., Corporate Parent National Bank Group Inc., Corporate Parent National Bank Acquisition Holding Inc. for National Bank Financial Inc.. Document filed by National Bank Financial Inc..(Davis, Harry)
March 2, 2018 Filing 64 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent National Bank of Canada, Corporate Parent National Bank of Canada Financial Group Inc., Corporate Parent NBF International Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent National Bank Financial Inc. for National Bank of Canada Financial Inc.. Document filed by National Bank of Canada Financial Inc..(Davis, Harry)
March 2, 2018 Filing 63 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by National Bank of Canada.(Davis, Harry)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Roger B Cowie to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #57 Motion for J. Matthew Goodin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
March 2, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 1, 2018 Filing 60 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent Merrill Lynch Canada Holdings Company, Corporate Parent Midland Walwyn Inc., Corporate Parent Merrill Lynch & Co., Canada Ltd., Corporate Parent Merrill Lynch International, LLC, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Merrill Lynch Canada Inc.. Document filed by Merrill Lynch Canada Inc..(Seshens, Dana)
March 1, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION for Roger B Cowie to Appear Pro Hac Vice *** CORRECTED ***. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by HSBC Bank Canada, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Corrected Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cowie, Roger)
March 1, 2018 Filing 58 CONSENT MOTION for Roger B Cowie to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- CORRECTED --. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by HSBC Bank Canada, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Corrected Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice WITH COGS, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cowie, Roger)
March 1, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #57 MOTION for J. Matthew Goodin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14759549. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 1, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION for J. Matthew Goodin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14759549. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by HSBC Bank Canada, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodin, James)
March 1, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #56 MOTION for Roger B Cowie to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14759085. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
March 1, 2018 Filing 56 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Roger B Cowie to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14759085. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by HSBC Bank Canada, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit in Support of Motion PHV, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cowie, Roger) Modified on 3/1/2018 (bcu).
March 1, 2018 Filing 55 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings plc for HSBC Bank Canada, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. Document filed by HSBC Bank Canada, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc..(Casamento, Gregory)
March 1, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Thomas Casamento on behalf of HSBC Bank Canada, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Casamento, Gregory)
February 28, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Jon Straub on behalf of CIBC World Markets Corp., CIBC World Markets, Inc., Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce. (Straub, Timothy)
February 28, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sandra Denise Hauser on behalf of CIBC World Markets Corp., CIBC World Markets, Inc., Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce. (Hauser, Sandra)
February 23, 2018 Filing 51 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of Nova Scotia for Scotia Capital Inc.. Document filed by Scotia Capital Inc..(Laguardia, Daniel)
February 23, 2018 Filing 50 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of Nova Scotia for Scotia Capital (USA) Inc.. Document filed by Scotia Capital (USA) Inc..(Laguardia, Daniel)
February 23, 2018 Filing 49 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Bank of Nova Scotia.(Laguardia, Daniel)
February 23, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Thomas Decker on behalf of Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Scotia Capital Inc., The Bank of Nova Scotia. (Decker, Edward)
February 23, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Jason Resetarits on behalf of Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Scotia Capital Inc., The Bank of Nova Scotia. (Resetarits, Jeffrey)
February 23, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John F. Cove, Jr on behalf of Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Scotia Capital Inc., The Bank of Nova Scotia. (Cove, John)
February 23, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia on behalf of Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Scotia Capital Inc., The Bank of Nova Scotia. (Laguardia, Daniel)
February 22, 2018 Filing 44 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG, Corporate Parent DB USA Corporation, Corporate Parent DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation for Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.; Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG for Deutsche Bank Securities Limited. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Limited.(Silverman, Moses)
February 22, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arianna Markel on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Limited. (Markel, Arianna)
February 22, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hallie Suzanne Goldblatt on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Limited. (Goldblatt, Hallie)
February 22, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aidan John Synnott on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Limited. (Synnott, Aidan)
February 22, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Moses Silverman on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Limited. (Silverman, Moses)
February 16, 2018 Filing 39 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank of Montreal for BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Financial Corp., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc.. Document filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Financial Corp., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of Montreal.(Hakki, Adam)
February 16, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Suzanne Skinner Forster on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Financial Corp., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of Montreal. (Forster, Suzanne)
February 16, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jerome Steven Fortinsky on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Financial Corp., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of Montreal. (Fortinsky, Jerome)
February 16, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Selim Hakki on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Financial Corp., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of Montreal. (Hakki, Adam)
February 15, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Harry Simeon Davis to RE-FILE Document #24 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
February 14, 2018 Filing 35 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Vincent Briganti dated February 14, 2018 re: Update on the status of service of the complaint. Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado.(Briganti, Vincent)
February 14, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Steel Mishkin on behalf of Merrill Lynch Canada Inc.. (Mishkin, Paul)
February 14, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dana Meredith Seshens on behalf of Merrill Lynch Canada Inc.. (Seshens, Dana)
February 13, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leah Friedman on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Canada. (Friedman, Leah)
February 13, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Corey Anne Calabrese on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Canada. (Calabrese, Corey)
February 13, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Kent Yatter on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Canada. (Yatter, Douglas)
February 13, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence Edward Buterman on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Canada. (Buterman, Lawrence)
February 13, 2018 Filing 28 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Dominion Securities Inc.. Document filed by RBC Dominion Securities Inc..(Owens, Richard)
February 13, 2018 Filing 27 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets, LLC. Document filed by RBC Capital Markets, LLC.(Owens, Richard)
February 13, 2018 Filing 26 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Royal Bank of Canada.(Owens, Richard)
February 13, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard David Owens on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Canada. (Owens, Richard)
February 13, 2018 Filing 24 FILING ERROR NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent National Bank of Canada Financial Inc. for National Bank Financial Inc.; Corporate Parent National Bank Financial Inc. for National Bank of Canada. Document filed by National Bank Financial Inc., National Bank of Canada, National Bank of Canada Financial Inc..(Davis, Harry) Modified on 2/15/2018 (lb).
February 13, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Theodore Kohn on behalf of National Bank Financial Inc., National Bank of Canada, National Bank of Canada Financial Inc.. (Kohn, Brian)
February 13, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harry Simeon Davis on behalf of National Bank Financial Inc., National Bank of Canada, National Bank of Canada Financial Inc.. (Davis, Harry)
February 8, 2018 Filing 21 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #20 Letter, filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. ENDORSEMENT: The Court adopts the schedule as outlined in this letter. (Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2018.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/8/2018) (ap)
February 7, 2018 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Vincent Briganti dated February 7, 2018 re: Proposed Schedule Governing Amendment of the Complaint and Service of the Remaining Defendants. Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado.(Briganti, Vincent)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Todd A. Seaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
February 6, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Todd A. Seaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14664537. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 5, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Todd A. Seaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14664537. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Seaver, Todd)
February 5, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee Jason Lefkowitz on behalf of Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Lefkowitz, Lee)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting in part #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The parties' motion is GRANTED in part. The parties are ORDERED to propose a schedule governing amendments of the complaint and service of the remaining defendants by Wednesday, February 7, 2018. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
February 2, 2018 Filing 15 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (On Behalf of the Plaintiff and All Named Defendants) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from David Sapir Lesser dated February 2, 2018. Document filed by TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Inc., Toronto-Dominion Bank.(Lesser, David)
February 2, 2018 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Toronto Dominion Holdings (U.S.A.), Inc. for TD Securities (USA) LLC; Other Affiliate TD Group US Holdings LLC for TD Securities Inc., Toronto-Dominion Bank. Document filed by TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Inc., Toronto-Dominion Bank.(Lesser, David)
February 2, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jamie Stephen Dycus on behalf of TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Inc., Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Dycus, Jamie)
February 2, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Sapir Lesser on behalf of TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Inc.. (Lesser, David)
January 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Raymond Peter Girnys on behalf of Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Girnys, Raymond)
January 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Thomas Egan on behalf of Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Egan, Patrick)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/17/2018) (cf)
January 16, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Financial Corp., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of America Merrill Lynch, Bank of Montreal, CIBC World Markets Corp., CIBC World Markets, Inc., Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Limited, HSBC Bank Canada, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Canada Inc., National Bank Financial Inc., National Bank of Canada, National Bank of Canada Financial Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Canada, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Scotia Capital Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Inc., The Bank of Nova Scotia, Toronto-Dominion Bank. (sj)
January 16, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 16, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
January 16, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
January 16, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Vincent Briganti. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
January 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roland Raymond St. Louis, III on behalf of Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (St. Louis, Roland)
January 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christian Levis on behalf of Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Levis, Christian)
January 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Dexter St. Phillip, Jr on behalf of Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (St. Phillip, Peter)
January 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Geoffrey Milbank Horn on behalf of Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Horn, Geoffrey)
January 12, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BANK OF MONTREAL, BMO FINANCIAL CORP., BMO NESBITT BURNS INC., BMO CAPITAL MARKETS CORP., BANK OF AMERICA MERRILL LYNCH, MERRILL LYNCH CANADA INC., DEUTSCHE BANK AG, DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES INC., DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES LIMITED, THE BANK OF NOVA SCOTIA, SCOTIA CAPITAL (USA) INC., SCOTIA CAPITAL INC., CANADIAN IMPERIAL BANK OF COMMERCE, CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP., CIBC WORLD MARKETS, INC., HSBC HOLDINGS PLC, HSBC BANK PLC, HSBC NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS INC., HSBC SECURITIES (USA) INC., HSBC BANK CANADA, NATIONAL BANK OF CANADA, NATIONAL BANK FINANCIAL INC., NATIONAL BANK OF CANADA FINANCIAL INC., ROYAL BANK OF CANADA, RBC DOMINION SECURITIES INC., RBC CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC, TORONTO-DOMINION BANK, TD SECURITIES INC., TD SECURITIES (USA) LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Briganti, Vincent)
January 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Schedule A)(Briganti, Vincent)
January 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Financial Corp., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of America Merrill Lynch, Bank of Montreal, CIBC World Markets Corp., CIBC World Markets, Inc., Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Limited, HSBC Bank Canada, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Canada Inc., National Bank Financial Inc., National Bank of Canada, National Bank of Canada Financial Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Canada, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Scotia Capital Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Inc., The Bank of Nova Scotia, Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14574313)Document filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A, #2 Appendix Appendix B)(Briganti, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado v. Bank of Montreal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank Canada
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Casamento
Represented By: Julia C Webb
Represented By: James Matthew Goodin
Represented By: Roger Brian Cowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Dominion Securities Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Kent Yatter
Represented By: Lawrence Edward Buterman
Represented By: Richard David Owens
Represented By: Corey Anne Calabrese
Represented By: Leah Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Bank Financial Inc.
Represented By: Harry Simeon Davis
Represented By: Brian Theodore Kohn
Represented By: Thomas Paul DeFranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Arianna Markel
Represented By: Moses Silverman
Represented By: Hallie Suzanne Goldblatt
Represented By: Aidan John Synnott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Canada
Represented By: Douglas Kent Yatter
Represented By: Lawrence Edward Buterman
Represented By: Richard David Owens
Represented By: Corey Anne Calabrese
Represented By: Leah Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Jamie Stephen Dycus
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings PLC
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Casamento
Represented By: Julia C Webb
Represented By: James Matthew Goodin
Represented By: Roger Brian Cowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Canada Inc.
Represented By: Dana Meredith Seshens
Represented By: Paul Steel Mishkin
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Represented By: Sheila Ruby Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Casamento
Represented By: Julia C Webb
Represented By: James Matthew Goodin
Represented By: Roger Brian Cowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Represented By: Arianna Markel
Represented By: Moses Silverman
Represented By: Hallie Suzanne Goldblatt
Represented By: Aidan John Synnott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Jerome Steven Fortinsky
Represented By: Suzanne Skinner Forster
Represented By: Ryan Ashby Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Montreal
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Jerome Steven Fortinsky
Represented By: Suzanne Skinner Forster
Represented By: Ryan Ashby Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of Nova Scotia
Represented By: Jeffrey Jason Resetarits
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia
Represented By: Edward Thomas Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Bank of Canada
Represented By: Harry Simeon Davis
Represented By: Brian Theodore Kohn
Represented By: Thomas Paul DeFranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Merrill Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Jerome Steven Fortinsky
Represented By: Suzanne Skinner Forster
Represented By: Ryan Ashby Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toronto-Dominion Bank
Represented By: Jamie Stephen Dycus
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Securities Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Stephen Dycus
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Bank of Canada Financial Inc.
Represented By: Harry Simeon Davis
Represented By: Brian Theodore Kohn
Represented By: Thomas Paul DeFranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotia Capital (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Jason Resetarits
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia
Represented By: Edward Thomas Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank PLC
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Casamento
Represented By: Julia C Webb
Represented By: James Matthew Goodin
Represented By: Roger Brian Cowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce
Represented By: Stephen J. Senderowitz
Represented By: Timothy Jon Straub
Represented By: William E. Walsh
Represented By: Sandra Denise Hauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIBC World Markets Corp.
Represented By: Stephen J. Senderowitz
Represented By: Timothy Jon Straub
Represented By: William E. Walsh
Represented By: Sandra Denise Hauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotia Capital Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Jason Resetarits
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia
Represented By: Edward Thomas Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC North America Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Casamento
Represented By: Julia C Webb
Represented By: James Matthew Goodin
Represented By: Roger Brian Cowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIBC World Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen J. Senderowitz
Represented By: Timothy Jon Straub
Represented By: William E. Walsh
Represented By: Sandra Denise Hauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Douglas Kent Yatter
Represented By: Lawrence Edward Buterman
Represented By: Richard David Owens
Represented By: Corey Anne Calabrese
Represented By: Leah Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Financial Corp.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Jerome Steven Fortinsky
Represented By: Suzanne Skinner Forster
Represented By: Ryan Ashby Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Limited
Represented By: Arianna Markel
Represented By: Moses Silverman
Represented By: Hallie Suzanne Goldblatt
Represented By: Aidan John Synnott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America Corporation
Represented By: Dana Meredith Seshens
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Represented By: Sheila Ruby Adams
Represented By: Paul Steel Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Dana Meredith Seshens
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Represented By: Sheila Ruby Adams
Represented By: Paul Steel Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC USA Inc.
Represented By: Julia C Webb
Represented By: James Matthew Goodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Julia C Webb
Represented By: James Matthew Goodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Dana Meredith Seshens
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Represented By: Sheila Ruby Adams
Represented By: Paul Steel Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado
Represented By: Geoffrey Milbank Horn
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Egan
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Roland Raymond St. Louis, III
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip, Jr
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Raymond Peter Girnys
Represented By: Todd Seaver
Represented By: Colleen Cleary
Represented By: Carl Hammarskjold
Represented By: Lee Jason Lefkowitz
Represented By: Matthew John Acocella
Represented By: Jessica Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?