Democratic National Committee v. The Russian Federation et al Featured Case

The Democratic National Committee (DNC) filed this lawsuit against the Russian government, top officials from the Trump campaign and WikiLeaks, alleging that the three conspired to disrupt the 2016 campaign and shift it in favor of then-candidate Donald Trump. The DNC seeks millions of dollars in compensation for damages incurred from being hacked.

Plaintiff: Democratic National Committee
Defendant: Paul J. Manafort, Jr., WikiLeaks, Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Richard W. Gates, III, George Papadopoulos, General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation, John Does 1-10, The Russian Federation, Julian Assange, GRU Operative Using the Pseudonym "Guccifer2.0", Joseph Mifsud, Roger J. Stone, Jr., Emin Araz Agalarov, Jared C. Kushner, Donald J. Trump, Jr. and General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation ("GRU")
Amicus Curiae: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, American Civil Liberties Union and Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
Case Number: 1:2018cv03501
Filed: April 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 262 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 256 MOTION for Sanctions . . Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Carvin, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Oral Argument set for 7/19/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
June 18, 2019 Filing 261 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 256 MOTION for Sanctions . . Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
June 10, 2019 Filing 260 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Joshua L. Dratel, Esq. dated June 10, 2019. Document filed by WikiLeaks.(Dratel, Joshua)
June 10, 2019 Filing 259 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #224 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by WikiLeaks. (Dratel, Joshua)
June 4, 2019 Filing 258 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. dated June 4, 2019 re: Request for Oral Argument on the Campaign's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions. Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc..(Carvin, Michael)
June 4, 2019 Filing 257 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #256 MOTION for Sanctions . . Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Carvin, Michael)
June 4, 2019 Filing 256 MOTION for Sanctions . Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc..(Carvin, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 255 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #233 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by George Papadopoulos. (Polisi, Caroline)
June 3, 2019 Filing 254 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #226 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Carvin, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 253 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Robert Buschel dated June 3, 2019. Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr.(Buschel, Robert)
June 3, 2019 Filing 252 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument #251 addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Christopher D. Man dated June 3, 2019. Document filed by Jared C. Kushner.(Man, Christopher)
June 3, 2019 Filing 251 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #229 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Jared C. Kushner. (Lowell, Abbe)
June 3, 2019 Filing 250 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #235 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr. (Buschel, Robert)
June 3, 2019 Filing 249 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Scott S. Balber dated June 3, 2019 re: Requesting Oral Argument on Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov.(Balber, Scott)
June 3, 2019 Filing 248 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #229 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov. (Balber, Scott)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #246 Letter filed by WikiLeaks. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/31/2019) ( Replies due by 6/10/2019.) (ks)
May 30, 2019 Filing 246 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Joshua L. Dratel, Esq. dated May 30, 2019 re: Respectfully requesting a one-week extension of the due date for Wikileaks' Reply Memorandum of Law.. Document filed by WikiLeaks.(Dratel, Joshua)
May 23, 2019 Filing 245 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER ATTACHMENT UNDER SEAL. The Court has received the attached letter from a member of the public relating to this case. The letter is filed under seal and is not being provided to the parties because it contains personal identifying information. The Court will decide this case based solely on the facts and the law as explained in the parties' filings and not on the basis of any letters filed with the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/22/19) (yv)
April 18, 2019 Filing 243 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Steven Berelovich on behalf of Democratic National Committee. (Berelovich, Eric)
April 18, 2019 Filing 242 DECLARATION of Joseph M. Sellers in Opposition re: #224 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint., #229 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
April 18, 2019 Filing 241 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #224 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint., #235 MOTION to Dismiss ., #223 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint., #226 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint., #229 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint., #233 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint., #221 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. and in Response to Statement of Immunity of the Russian Federation #186 . Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting #239 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/15/19) (yv)
April 12, 2019 Filing 239 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Joseph M. Sellers dated April 12, 2019. Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Sellers, Joseph)
March 13, 2019 Filing 238 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. (Attachments: #1 Amici Curiae Brief)(Decell, Caroline)
March 13, 2019 Filing 237 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caroline Decell on behalf of Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Civil Liberties Union. (Decell, Caroline)
March 6, 2019 Filing 236 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #235 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Guccifer 2.0 tweet, #2 Exhibit Podesta's time n the barrel tweet)(Buschel, Robert)
March 6, 2019 Filing 235 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr.(Buschel, Robert)
March 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Robert C. Buschel to RE-FILE Document #232 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Document(s) linked to filing error. (db)
March 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Robert C. Buschel to RE-FILE Document #231 MOTION to Dismiss . ERROR(S): No signature or s/. (db)
March 4, 2019 Filing 234 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #233 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by George Papadopoulos. (Alexander, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2019 Filing 233 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by George Papadopoulos.(Alexander, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2019 Filing 232 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #231 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Guccifer 2.0 tweet, #2 Exhibit Podesta's time n the barrel tweet)(Buschel, Robert) Modified on 3/6/2019 (db).
March 4, 2019 Filing 231 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr.(Buschel, Robert) Modified on 3/6/2019 (db).
March 4, 2019 Filing 230 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #229 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov. (Balber, Scott)
March 4, 2019 Filing 229 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov.(Balber, Scott)
March 4, 2019 Filing 228 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. dated March 4, 2019 re: Request for Oral Argument on the Campaign's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc..(Carvin, Michael)
March 4, 2019 Filing 227 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #226 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Carvin, Michael)
March 4, 2019 Filing 226 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc..(Carvin, Michael)
March 4, 2019 Filing 225 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #224 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by WikiLeaks. (Dratel, Joshua)
March 4, 2019 Filing 224 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by WikiLeaks.(Dratel, Joshua)
March 4, 2019 Filing 223 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Richard W. Gates, III.(Brodsky, William)
March 4, 2019 Filing 222 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #221 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Jared C. Kushner. (Lowell, Abbe)
March 4, 2019 Filing 221 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Jared C. Kushner.(Lowell, Abbe)
March 4, 2019 Filing 220 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Jeffrey Alexander dated March 4, 2019. Document filed by George Papadopoulos.(Alexander, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2019 Filing 219 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Joshua L. Dratel, Esq. dated March 4, 2019 re: Respectfully requesting that the Court allow Wikileaks to file a Supplemental Memorandum of Law. Document filed by WikiLeaks.(Dratel, Joshua)
March 4, 2019 Filing 218 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Robert Buschel dated March 4, 2019. Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr.(Buschel, Robert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 217 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #182 Amended Complaint,, against Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov, Julian Assange, Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Richard W. Gates, III, Jared C. Kushner, Paul J. Manafort, Jr, Joseph Mifsud, George Papadopoulos, Roger J. Stone, Jr, The Russian Federation, Donald J. Trump, Jr, WikiLeaks with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Democratic National Committee. Related document: #182 Amended Complaint,,.(Eisenkraft, Michael)
January 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft to RE-FILE Document No. #216 Amended Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. The Second Amended Complaint was filed incorrectly on the due date. Permission from Chambers will be need to be granted in order to re-file. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) Modified on 1/18/2019 (pc).
January 17, 2019 Filing 216 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #182 Amended Complaint,, against Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov, Julian Assange, Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., GRU Operative Using the Pseudonym "Guccifer2.0", Richard W. Gates, III, General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation ("GRU"), John Does 1-10, Jared C. Kushner, Paul J. Manafort, Jr, Joseph Mifsud, George Papadopoulos, Roger J. Stone, Jr, The Russian Federation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Democratic National Committee. Related document: #182 Amended Complaint,,.(Eisenkraft, Michael) Modified on 1/18/2019 (pc).
January 7, 2019 Filing 215 NOTICE of Intent to Amend Complaint. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
December 14, 2018 Filing 214 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Joshua L. Dratel, Esq. dated December 14, 2018 Document filed by WikiLeaks.(Dratel, Joshua)
December 7, 2018 Filing 213 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. dated December 7, 2018 re: Request for Oral Argument on the Campaign's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc..(Carvin, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 212 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #211 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Carvin, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 211 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc..(Carvin, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 210 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc..(Carvin, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting #198 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/7/18) (yv)
December 7, 2018 Filing 208 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #206 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by WikiLeaks. (Dratel, Joshua)
December 7, 2018 Filing 207 DECLARATION of Joshua L. Dratel in Support re: #206 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by WikiLeaks. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D)(Dratel, Joshua)
December 7, 2018 Filing 206 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Document filed by WikiLeaks.(Dratel, Joshua)
December 7, 2018 Filing 205 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Points and Authorities to support Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Guccifer 2.0 thanks, #2 Exhibit Podesta's time in the barrel, #3 Exhibit Stone Timeline)(Buschel, Robert)
December 7, 2018 Filing 204 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shira Lauren Feldman on behalf of George Papadopoulos. (Feldman, Shira)
December 7, 2018 Filing 203 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr.(Buschel, Robert)
December 7, 2018 Filing 202 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #195 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. . Document filed by George Papadopoulos. (Polisi, Caroline)
December 7, 2018 Filing 201 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #200 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Jared C. Kushner. (Lowell, Abbe)
December 7, 2018 Filing 200 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Jared C. Kushner.(Lowell, Abbe)
December 6, 2018 Filing 199 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey R. Alexander on behalf of George Papadopoulos. (Alexander, Jeffrey)
December 6, 2018 Filing 198 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Robert Buschel dated December 6, 2018. Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr.(Buschel, Robert)
December 6, 2018 Filing 197 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #196 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov. (Balber, Scott)
December 6, 2018 Filing 196 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov.(Balber, Scott)
December 6, 2018 Filing 195 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by George Papadopoulos.(Polisi, Caroline)
December 6, 2018 Filing 194 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Richard W. Gates, III. Responses due by 12/7/2018(Brodsky, William)
December 6, 2018 Filing 193 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William M. Brodsky on behalf of Richard W. Gates, III. (Brodsky, William)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #191 Letter, filed by George Papadopoulos. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/30/2018) (jca)
November 30, 2018 Filing 191 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Caroline Johnston Polisi, Esq. dated 11/30/2018 re: Respectfully requesting that the Court allow Mr. Papadopoulos to file a 25-page separate memorandum of law in support of his motion to dismiss. Document filed by George Papadopoulos.(Polisi, Caroline)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #188 Letter requesting that the Court allow Wikileaks to file a 25-page separate memo of law in support of its motion to dismiss, filed by WikiLeaks. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/29/18) (yv)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER. The Court has received the attached communication from the United States Department of State relating to the attempted service on the Russian Federation and other entities in Russia. The communication will be filed on the docket together with this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/19/18) (yv)
November 19, 2018 Filing 188 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Joshua L. Dratel, Esq. dated November 19, 2018 re: Respectfully requesting that the Court allow Wikileaks to file a 25-page separate memo of law in support of its motion to dismiss. Document filed by WikiLeaks.(Dratel, Joshua)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER. The Court has received the attached letter from the Ambassador of the Russian Federation, which will be filed in the docket of this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/9/18) (yv)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER. The Court has received the attached facsimile, and is filing it along with this order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/8/18) (yv)
October 19, 2018 Filing 185 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/13/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 19, 2018 Filing 184 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/13/2018 before Judge John G. Koeltl. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 10, 2018 Filing 183 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Lewis Dratel on behalf of WikiLeaks. (Dratel, Joshua)
October 5, 2018 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for two copies of the summonses and complaint, notice of suit, copy of the electronic case filing rules and instructions, court's individual practices in English and Russian and notarized translation certifications for each document mailed to GRU Operative Using Pseudonym "Guccifer 2.0" on 06/12/2018 by Federal Express tracking # 810606318718, as per #102 Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 09/07/2018. (smc)
October 5, 2018 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for two copies of the summonses and complaint, notice of suit, copy of the electronic case and filing rules and instructions, court's individual practices in English and Russian, notarized translation certifications for each document mailed to The Russian Federation on 06/12/2018 by Federal Express tracking # 810606318707, as per #101 Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 09/07/2018. (smc)
October 5, 2018 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for two copies of the summonses and complaint, notice of suit, electronic case filing rules and instructions, court's individual practices in English and Russian and notarized translation certifications for each document mailed to General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation on 06/12/2018 by Federal Express tracking # 810606318729, as per #100 Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 09/07/2018. (smc) Modified on 10/5/2018 (smc).
October 3, 2018 Filing 182 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #6 Complaint, against Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov, Julian Assange, Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Richard W. Gates, III, General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation ("GRU"), Jared C. Kushner, Paul J. Manafort, Jr, Joseph Mifsud, George Papadopoulos, Roger J. Stone, Jr, The Russian Federation, Donald J. Trump, Jr, WikiLeaks with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Democratic National Committee. Related document: #6 Complaint,.(Eisenkraft, Michael)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 SCHEDULING ORDER: If Plaintiff intends to file a Second Amended Complaint, the following schedule shall apply: Plaintiff shall file a Notice of intent to Amend by January 7, 2019. Plaintiff shall file the Second Amended Complaint by January 17, 2019. Defendants shall file their motions to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint by March 4, 2019. Plaintiff shall file oppositions to Defendants' motions to dismiss by April 18, 2019. Defendants shall file their replies, if any, to Plaintiffs' oppositions by June 3, 2019. Defendants Aras Agalarov and Emin Agalarov may file a 25 page opening brief and a 15 page reply brief; The plaintiff may file a 25 page in opposition. Defendant Donald Trump, Jr. may file a 25 page opening brief and a 15 page reply brief; The plaintiff may file a 25 page brief in opposition and page limits. The parties proposed briefing schedule is granted. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 10/3/2018, Motions due by 12/7/2018, Responses due by 2/11/2019, Replies due by 3/29/2019.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/1/2018) (jca)
September 28, 2018 Filing 180 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Horwitz, Julia)
September 21, 2018 Filing 179 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael Paul Jones on behalf of Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov. New Address: Herbert Smith Freehills New York LLP, 450 Lexington Avenue, New York, NY, USA 10017, 917-542-7600. (Jones, Michael)
September 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Grant Jeffrey Smith to RE-FILE Document #171 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Personal Electronic Device Application addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Grant J. Smith dated September 11, 2018. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (db)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #97 Motion for Alison Sarah Deich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/18/18) (yv)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER: As discussed at the hearing today, the parties should file a proposed scheduling order by September 28, 2018. The plaintiff should file an Amended Complaint by October 12, 2018. ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/12/2018.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/13/2018) (mro)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #169 Motion for Christopher D. Man to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/11/2018) (mro)
September 12, 2018 Filing 175 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Christopher Cross on behalf of Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov. (Cross, Jonathan)
September 11, 2018 Filing 174 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pamela Kathleen Terry on behalf of Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov. (Terry, Pamela)
September 11, 2018 Filing 173 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Paul Jones on behalf of Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov. (Jones, Michael)
September 11, 2018 Filing 172 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Sonny Balber on behalf of Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov. (Balber, Scott)
September 11, 2018 Filing 171 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Personal Electronic Device Application addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Grant J. Smith dated September 11, 2018. Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Request for Electronic Device)(Smith, Grant) Modified on 9/20/2018 (db).
September 10, 2018 Filing 170 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Norman Lavigne on behalf of George Papadopoulos. (Lavigne, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #169 MOTION for Christopher D. Man to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15548135. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 10, 2018 Filing 169 MOTION for Christopher D. Man to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15548135. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jared C. Kushner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: DC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B: MO Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Man, Christopher)
September 7, 2018 Filing 168 STATUS REPORT. Status Conference Statement Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Sellers, Joseph)
September 7, 2018 Filing 167 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Horwitz, Julia)
September 6, 2018 Filing 166 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric M. Creizman on behalf of George Papadopoulos. (Creizman, Eric)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #160 Motion for Grant J Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HERE BY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/4/18) (yv)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting #162 Letter Motion for Conference. The 9/13/18 conference can be used as a pre-motion conference for the plaintiff's application to file an amended complaint. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/3/18) (yv)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #161 Motion for Mary Ellen Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick Part I on 8/31/2018) (ne)
August 31, 2018 Filing 162 LETTER MOTION for Conference (pre-motion conference) addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Joseph M. Sellers dated August 31, 2018. Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Sellers, Joseph)
August 31, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #161 MOTION for Mary Ellen Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15515789. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 30, 2018 Filing 161 MOTION for Mary Ellen Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15515789. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mary Ellen Powers, #2 Exhibit to Affidavit of Mary Ellen Powers, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, Mary Ellen)
August 30, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #160 MOTION for Grant J. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15514700. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 30, 2018 Filing 160 MOTION for Grant J. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15514700. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit certificate of good standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Grant)
August 27, 2018 Filing 159 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Caroline Johnston Polisi on behalf of George Papadopoulos. New Address: Pierce Bainbridge Beck Price & Hecht LLP, 20 West 23rd Street, 5th Fl., New York, NY, USA 10010, (213) 262-9333. (Polisi, Caroline)
August 27, 2018 Filing 158 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caroline Johnston Polisi on behalf of George Papadopoulos. (Polisi, Caroline)
August 16, 2018 Filing 157 DECLARATION of Julia A. Horwitz of service of process. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Witness statement, #3 Exhibit C - Prefatory materials)(Horwitz, Julia)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #149 Motion to Serve Wikileaks by Twitter and Mail on #148 NOTICE of Motion, filed by Democratic National Committee. ENDORSEMENT: The motion is granted. The Clerk is directed to close Docket No. 149. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/6/18) (yv)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #151 Motion to Serve Aras Agalarov by Alternate Means. ENDORSEMENT: The motion is granted. The Clerk is directed to close Docket No. 151. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/6/18) (yv)
July 25, 2018 Filing 154 NOTICE of Motion re: #151 MOTION to Serve Defendant Aras Agalarov by Alternate Means.. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
July 24, 2018 Filing 153 DECLARATION of Julia A. Horwitz in Support re: #151 MOTION to Serve Defendant Aras Agalarov by Alternate Means.. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sellers, Joseph)
July 24, 2018 Filing 152 DECLARATION of Geoffrey Graber in Support re: #151 MOTION to Serve Defendant Aras Agalarov by Alternate Means.. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
July 24, 2018 Filing 151 MOTION to Serve Defendant Aras Agalarov by Alternate Means. Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Sellers, Joseph)
July 20, 2018 Filing 150 DECLARATION of Julia Horwitz in Support re: #149 MOTION to Serve Defendant Wikileaks by Twitter and Mail.. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Sellers, Joseph)
July 20, 2018 Filing 149 MOTION to Serve Defendant Wikileaks by Twitter and Mail. Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Sellers, Joseph)
July 20, 2018 Filing 148 NOTICE of Motion. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
July 19, 2018 Filing 147 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Joseph M. Sellers, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Julia Horwitz, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Due Diligence for Defendant Kushner, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Due Diligence for Defendant Aras Agalarov)(Sellers, Joseph)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE #138 Motion for William D. Coglianese to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules Governing discipline of a attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/18/18) (yv)
July 19, 2018 Filing 145 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abbe David Lowell on behalf of Jared C. Kushner. (Lowell, Abbe)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE #139 Motion for Michael A. Carvin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules Governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/17/18) (yv)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: #141 MOTION to Serve Defendant Jared Kuschner by First Class Mail. filed by Democratic National Committee. The motion to serve Kushner by first class mail is therefore denied without prejudice to renewal. The Clerk is directed to close the motion at docket number 141. The Court also notes that service of process is intended to provide notice of a lawsuit to a defendant so that the issues of the case can be joined and the lawsuit decided on its merit or lack of merit. Service is not intended to be a game for the serving party or the party to be served. The Court is confident that the DNC's counsel can contact Kushner's counsel and arrange a mutually convenient means to effectuate service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/17/18) (yv)
July 17, 2018 Filing 142 DECLARATION of Julia Horwitz in Support re: #141 MOTION to Serve Defendant Jared Kuschner by First Class Mail.. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
July 17, 2018 Filing 141 MOTION to Serve Defendant Jared Kuschner by First Class Mail. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Due Diligence, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Due Diligence, #3 Exhibit USPS Tracking, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Due Diligence)(Sellers, Joseph)
July 17, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #139 MOTION for Michael A. Carvin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15333043. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #138 MOTION for William D. Coglianese to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15332481. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #137 Motion to Serve Defendant Paul J. Manafort, Jr. by First Class Mail and Email to His Criminal Attorneys. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/17/18) (yv)
July 17, 2018 Filing 139 MOTION for Michael A. Carvin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15333043. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael A. Carvin, #2 Exhibit to Affidavit of Michael A. Carvin, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Carvin, Michael)
July 17, 2018 Filing 138 MOTION for William D. Coglianese to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15332481. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William D. Coglianese, #2 Exhibit to Affidavit of William D. Coglianese, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Coglianese, William)
July 16, 2018 Filing 137 MOTION to Serve Defendant Paul J. Manafort, Jr. by First Class Mail and Email to His Criminal Attorneys. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Eisenkraft, Michael)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #134 Motion for Robert Craig Buschel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/10/2018) (ama)
July 9, 2018 Filing 135 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Inga Madzule. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
July 9, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #134 MOTION for Robert Craig Buschel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15294751. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 9, 2018 Filing 134 MOTION for Robert Craig Buschel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15294751. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit good standing Florida, #3 Exhibit good standing California, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Buschel, Robert)
July 6, 2018 Filing 133 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was made by Mail (Fed Ex). Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fed Ex Tracking Proof)(Sellers, Joseph)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to return any filings sent to the Court in this case by Mr. Farrell without docketing them. Mr. Farrell may bring any other case consistent with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/6/18) (yv)
June 26, 2018 Filing 130 CERTIFICATION & NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (LOCAL RULE 7.1-1). Document filed by Patrick Farrell. (sc)
June 26, 2018 Filing 129 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Emin Araz Agalarov served on 6/13/2018, answer due 7/5/2018. Service was accepted by Inga Madzule - Live In Nanny. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
June 22, 2018 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #130 Letter. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (sc) Modified on 6/25/2018 (sc).
June 22, 2018 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #129 Letter. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (sc)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Mr. Christenson is free to bring any civil actions for relief in the Court by bringing new actions that seek proper relief. He may not, however, continue to attempt to file papers in this action, in which he is not a party and has been denied intervention. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/21/18) (yv)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David Christenson, dated 6/13/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED AND CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - AMICUS (TWENTY-NINE). (sc)
June 19, 2018 Filing 128 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, dated 6/14/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS (THIRTY). (sc)
June 19, 2018 Filing 125 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, dated 6/13/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - OBJECTION & MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. (sc)
June 19, 2018 Filing 124 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David Christenson,dated 6/13/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS (TWENTY-EIGHT). (sc) Modified on 7/19/2018 (sc).
June 19, 2018 Filing 123 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David Christenson, dated 6/11/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) / AMICUS(TWENTY-FOUR). (sc)
June 18, 2018 Filing 122 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David Christenson, dated 6/12/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED AND CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - AMICUS(TWENTY-SEVEN). (sc)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #108 Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting #110 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting #111 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. ENDORSEMENT: 1. Conference adjourned to 9/13/2018 at 04:30 P.M. 2. Time for all defendants to respond to the complaint extended to a time to be set at the 9/13/18 conference. So Ordered. (Initial Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/15/18) (yv)
June 15, 2018 Filing 120 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David Christenson, dated 6/11/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED AND CORRPUT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - AMICUS(TWENTY-SIX). (sc)
June 15, 2018 Filing 118 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David Christenson dated 6/11/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCD & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) -AMICUS(TWENTY-FIVE)FIRST RESPONDERS & SUICIDES. (sc)
June 15, 2018 Filing 117 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, ECF Filing Rules & Instructions, Individual Practices of Judge John G. Koeltl served on Richard W. Gates III on 06/11/2018. Service was accepted by Brooke Gates, Wife of Richard W. Gates, III. Service was made by In Person. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
June 14, 2018 Filing 111 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Suspend Deadline for Responding to the Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Robert Buschel dated June 14, 2018. Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr.(Buschel, Robert)
June 13, 2018 Filing 119 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, dated 6/8/18 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that he has a right to file a Motion for Reconsideration; that the Court may not grant the motion, but it must be considered; and that he is waiting for the appropriate time to file. (sc)
June 13, 2018 Filing 116 LETTER from David A. Christenson, dated 6/6/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) / AMICUS(NINETEEN). (sc)
June 13, 2018 Filing 113 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, dated 6/6/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - AMICUS(TWENTY-TWO). (sc)
June 13, 2018 Filing 110 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Suspend Deadline for Responding to the Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Defendant Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. dated June 13, 2018. Document filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc..(Gross, James)
June 13, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Matthew Gross on behalf of Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Gross, James)
June 12, 2018 Filing 115 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David Christenson dated 6/8/18 re: RACKETEER INFUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS(TWENTY-THREE). (sc)
June 12, 2018 Filing 114 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, dated 6/6/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS(TWENTY). (sc)
June 12, 2018 Filing 112 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, dated 6/6/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - AMICUS (TWENTY-ONE) -HERE IS PROOF THAT NATHAN FOREMAN IS INNOCENT AND THIS IS ONLY A DROP IN THE BUCKET. ATTACHED IS JONATHAN BAILEY'S AFFIDAVIT ETC. (sc)
June 12, 2018 Filing 108 MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Suspend the Deadline for Responding to the Complaint. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sellers, Joseph)
June 12, 2018 Filing 106 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, dated 6/5/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - AMICUS(EIGHTEEN A). (sc)
June 12, 2018 Filing 105 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson dated 6/4/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - AMICUS (SEVENTEEN B). (sc)
June 12, 2018 Filing 104 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, dated 6/4/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - AMICUS (SEVENTEEN A). (sc)
June 12, 2018 Filing 102 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the summonses and complaint, notice of suit, copy of the electronic case filing rules and instructions, court's individual practices in English and Russian and notarized translation certifications for each document. And a check for $2,275.00 mailed to GRU Operative Using Pseudonym "Guccifer 2.0" on June 12, 2018 by Federal Express tracking # FedEx 810606318718, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jca)
June 12, 2018 Filing 101 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the summonses and complaint, notice of suit, copy of the electronic case and filing rules and instructions, court's individual practices in English and Russian, notarized translation certifications for each document. Also a check for $2,275.00 mailed to The Russian Federation on June 12, 2018 by Federal Express tracking # FedEx 810606318707, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jca)
June 12, 2018 Filing 100 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the summonses and complaint, notice of suit, electronic case filing rules and instructions, court's individual practices in English and Russian and notarized translation certifications for each document. Also a check for 2,275.00 mailed to General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation on June 12, 2018 by Federal Express tracking # FedEx 810606318729, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jca)
June 11, 2018 Filing 107 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, dated 6/5/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO) - AMICUS(EIGHTEEN B). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(sc)
June 11, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE THAT Patrick Farrell INTENDS TO FILE RICO & COUNTER COMPLAINT IN THIS CASE AGAINST DEFENDANTS-EVIDENCE OF TRUMP-RUSSIA COLLUSION. (Attachments: #1 Main Document, #2 Main Document)(sc)
June 8, 2018 Filing 99 LETTER from David A. Christenson, dated 6/2/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPTION ACT(RICO) -AMICUS(SIXTEEN). (sc)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER. Dkt. No. 95 is stricken. There was no permission granted to file the amicus brief. If Mr. Farrell continues to make filings that do not seek any appropriate relief, he may be subject to an anti-filing injunction. So ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/7/2018) (rjm)
June 7, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #97 MOTION for Alison Sarah Deich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15168761. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
June 7, 2018 Filing 97 MOTION for Alison Sarah Deich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15168761. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Deich, Alison)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER....The Court has reviewed the filings of David Christenson, which do not seek any relief in this case to which Mr. Christenson is entitled. In particular, Dkt. Nos. 90 and 91 are stricken. Mr. Christenson is advised that if he continues to make filings that do not seek appropriate relief in this case he may be subject of an anti-filing injunction. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/6/18) (yv)
June 6, 2018 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 95 from the case record. The document was stricken in its entirety from this case pursuant to #98 Order. (rjm)
June 6, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Robert Craig Buschel to RE-FILE Document #94 Notice (Other). The Certificate of Good Standing needs to be issued by the Supreme Court of Florida (not the state bar) and filed as an attachment to your Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (jc)
June 6, 2018 Filing 94 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Certificate of good standing re: #93 MOTION for Robert Craig Buschel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15164095. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr. (Buschel, Robert) Modified on 6/6/2018 (jc).
June 6, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #93 MOTION for Robert Craig Buschel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15164095. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificates of Good Standing from Supreme Courts of California and Florida. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
June 6, 2018 Filing 93 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Robert Craig Buschel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15164095. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Roger J. Stone, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Buschel, Robert) Modified on 6/6/2018 (jc).
June 6, 2018 Filing 92 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. George Papadopoulos waiver sent on 5/2/2018, answer due 7/2/2018. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
June 5, 2018 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 91 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #96 Order Striking Document from Record,. (yv)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #77 Motion for Julia Ann Horwitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Julia Ann Horwitz for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/5/18) (yv)
June 5, 2018 Filing 88 LETTER from David A. Christenson, dated 5/28/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED AND CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS(TWELVE). (sc)
June 5, 2018 Filing 87 LETTER from David Christenson, dated 5/28/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS (ELEVEN). (sc)
June 5, 2018 Filing 86 LETTER from David Christenson, dated 5/28/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ MEMORIAL DAY 2018. (sc)
June 5, 2018 Filing 85 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Donald J. Trump, Jr waiver sent on 5/2/2018, answer due 7/2/2018. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
June 4, 2018 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 90 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #96 Order Striking Document from Record,. (yv)
June 4, 2018 Filing 84 LETTER from David A. Christenson, dated 5/28/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS (TEN). (sc)
June 4, 2018 Filing 83 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Roger J. Stone, Jr waiver sent on 5/2/2018, answer due 7/2/2018. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER. Dkt. No. 78 is stricken. There was no permission granted to file the amicus brief. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/30/18) (yv)
May 30, 2018 Filing 81 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Chrisenson, dated 5/22/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS(SEVENTH) - OPEN LETTER TO JUDGES KOELTL, SULLIVAN MOSS, JACKSON, STEWART, HIGGINBOTHAM, BATTANI, ELLIS ET AL. (sc)
May 30, 2018 Filing 80 LETTER from David A. Christenson dated 5/25/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ SUICIDE - AMICUS (EIGHT) - SUICIDE. (sc)
May 25, 2018 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 78 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #82 Order Striking Document from Record. (yv) Modified on 5/31/2018 (yv).
May 25, 2018 Filing 79 LETTER from David A. Christenson, a non-party, dated 5/20/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS(SIXTH) - WHAT IF? WHAT IF THIS IS WHY TRUMP WAS ELECTED? WHAT IF THEY NEEDED AN IDIOT/PUPPET AND TRUMP FIT THE BILL? WHAT IF TRUMP IS THE MANCHURIAN CANDIDATE? JUST WHAT IF?. (sc)
May 24, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #77 MOTION for Julia Ann Horwitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15115096. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
May 24, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION for Julia Ann Horwitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15115096. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Horwitz, Julia)
May 24, 2018 Filing 76 LETTER from David A. Christenson, dated 5/20/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/AMICUS(SEVENTH AND FINAL). (sc)
May 23, 2018 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #75 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (yv)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Leave to Serve Three Foreign Defendants Through the Secretary of State under 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Three Foreign Defendants Through the Secretary of State Under 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4) is GRANTED, and it is further ORDERED that for each Defendant to be served pursuant to this Order, Plaintiff shall send two copies of the summons and complaint, a notice of suit, a copy of the Electronic Case Filing Rules and Instructions, and this Court's individual practices, together with a translation of each into Russian, by any form of mail requiring a signed receipt to the Clerk, and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall address and dispatch these documents to the Secretary of State in Washington, District of Columbia, to the attention of the Director of Special Consular Services, and it is further ORDERED that the Secretary shall transmit one copy of the papers through diplomatic channels to the Russian Federation and shall send to the clerk of the court a certified copy of the diplomatic note indicating when the papers were transmitted. Because this Order is necessarily issued without input from the Three Foreign Defendants to be served, it is without prejudice to any argument they may make in opposition to the requested service. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/23/18) (yv)
May 23, 2018 Filing 73 LETTER from David Christenson, a non-party, re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATIONS ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS(FIFTH). (sc)
May 23, 2018 Filing 72 LETTER from David Christenson, a non-party, re: RACKETEER INFLUENCES & CORRUPT ORGANIZATIONS ACT(RICO)/ MOTION TO APPOINT CHIEF JUDGE CARL E. STEWART(5TH), JUSTICE PATRICK E. HIGGINBOTHAM(5TH), MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSEPH C. WILKINSON JR.(EDLA) AND CLERK LYLE W. CAYCE(5TH) TO REPRESENT THE FEDERAL JUDICIARY AS A PARTY. (sc)
May 23, 2018 Filing 71 LETTER from David Christenson, a non-party, re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED AND CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ AMICUS(FOURTH). (sc) Modified on 5/23/2018 (sc).
May 22, 2018 Filing 74 LETTER from David A. Christenson, re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/ UNDER SEAL QUESTION? CHIEF JUSTICE CARL STEWART, JUSTICE PATRICK HIGGINBOTHAM AND JUDGE JOHN KOELTL, AM I A VEXATIOUS LITIGANT?ETC. (sc)
May 22, 2018 Filing 70 LETTER from David Christenson, a non-party re: AMICUS(THIRD)(PART 2 OF 2). (sc)
May 22, 2018 Filing 69 LETTER from David A. Christenson, a non-party re: AMICUS(SECOND) (PART 1 OF 2). (sc)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: Non-party David Andrew Christenson has made numerous filings with the Court in this case (see Dkt. Nos. 45, 46, 47, 48, 49, 50, 51, 52, 53, 54, 55, 56, 58, 60, 61, 62, 63). Many of these filings seek to alert the Court to Mr. Christenson's filings in other courts. None of these filings require any action by the Court. To the extent that any of these filings request relief from the Court, they are denied because Mr. Christenson has not shown that he is entitled to any relief. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/21/2018) (mro)
May 21, 2018 Filing 68 LETTER from David A. Christenson, a non-party re: UNDER SEAL LETTER AND MOTION TO AMEND. (sc)
May 21, 2018 Filing 67 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, a non-party re: AMICUS / THIS IS ELECTION TAMPERING/ WHY ARE POLITICIANS NOT TALKING ABOUT THIS?. (sc)
May 18, 2018 Filing 65 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Donald J. Trump For President, Inc. waiver sent on 5/2/2018, answer due 7/2/2018. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Sellers, Joseph)
May 18, 2018 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to Serve Three Foreign Defendants Through the Secretary of State under 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4) . Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Complaint - English, #2 Complaint - Russian, #3 ECF Instructions - Eng., #4 ECF Instructions - Russian, #5 FSIA English, #6 FSIA Russian, #7 GRU Summons English, #8 GRU Summons Russian, #9 Guccifer Summons English, #10 Guccifer Summons Russian, #11 Koetl Practices English, #12 Koetl Practices - Russian, #13 Notice of Suit Russian, #14 Notice of Suit, #15 Russian Fed. Summons English, #16 Russian Fed. Summons Russian, #17 Translation Certificate, #18 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sellers, Joseph)
May 16, 2018 Filing 63 LETTER from David A. Christenson, a non-party, dated 5/12/18 re: RACKETEER INFLUENCED & CORRUPT ORGANIZATION ACT(RICO)/OPEN LETTER. (sc)
May 16, 2018 Filing 60 LETTER from David A. Christenson, a non-party, dated 5/11/18 re: ADDENDUM EIGHTEEN TO WRIT OF MANDAMUS & PROHIBITION. (sc) Modified on 5/16/2018 (sc).
May 15, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Document filed by David A. Christenson, a non-party. (sc)
May 15, 2018 Filing 59 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to GRU Operative Using the Pseudonym "Guccifer2.0". (jgo)
May 15, 2018 Filing 58 LETTER from David Christenson, dated 5/8/18 re: ADDENDUM SIXTEEN TO WRIT OF MANDAMUS & PROHIBITION/ WHO IS NATHAN FOREMAN? (sc) Modified on 5/15/2018 (sc).
May 14, 2018 Filing 61 LETTER from David A. Christenson, a non-party, dated 5/9/18 re: ADDENDUM SEVENTEEN TO WRIT OF MANDAMUS & PROHIBITION. (sc)
May 14, 2018 Filing 57 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GRU Operative Using Pseudonym "Guccifer 2.0", re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
May 11, 2018 Filing 56 LETTER from David A. Christenson, dated 5/8/18 re: ADDENDUM FIFTEEN TO WRIT OF MANDAMUS & PROHIBITION. (sc)
May 11, 2018 Filing 55 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Christenson, a non-party movant, re: ADDENDUM FOURTEEN TO WRIT OF MANDAMUS & PROHIBITION "UNFETTERED POWER". (sc)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying #46 Motion to Intervene. The emergency motion to intervene and join (Dkt. No. 46) is denied for the same reasons stated in the Court's Order of April 28, 2018 (Dkt. No. 44). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/9/2018) (mml)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #51 Letter. ENDORSEMENT: This paper should be filed. To the extent it requests any relief, it is denied because there is no showing of any relief that the plaintiff requests to which he is entitled. So ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/8/2018) (anc) Modified on 7/16/2018 (anc).
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. The attached motion to dismiss the plaintiff's complaint is denied because the Court has already denied the petitioner's motion to intervene. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/8/2018) (rjm)
May 8, 2018 Filing 51 LETTER from David A. Christenson, dated 5/1/18 re: RESPONSE & MOTION TO JUDGE KOELTL'S ORDER DENYING MY MOTION TO JOIN, ETC. (sc)
May 8, 2018 Filing 50 LETTER from David A. Christenson, re: MOTION TO DISMISS THE DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE'S COMPLAINT. (sc)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: The motion for a continuance and/or extension (Dkt. No. 48) is denied as moot based on the Court's denial of the petitioner's previous motion to intervene. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/5/2018) (mml)
May 1, 2018 Filing 48 LETTER from David A. Christenson, re: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE/ EXTENSION(until 9/1/18). (sc)
April 30, 2018 Filing 47 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David Andrew Christenson dated 4/24/2018 re: You and the American People have a Constitutional Right to know what escaped from the World Trade Centers during 911 and what escaped from the Strategic National Stockpile during Hurricane Katrina. ENDORSEMENT: This should be filed along with previous filings. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/30/2018) (cf)
April 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying #25 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The motion to intervene (Dkt. No. 25) is denied because the movant has failed to show any basis for intervention, whether as of right or otherwise. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/28/2018) (mml)
April 27, 2018 Filing 46 EMERGENCY MOTION TO INTERVENE & EMERGENCY MOTION TO JOIN.(sc)
April 27, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE that David Andrew Christenson Intends to File a Rackateer Influence & Corrupt Organization Act(RICO) Complaint etc. and Counter Complaint in this Case Against All Plaintiffs and Defendants. (sc)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #41 Motion for Geoffrey Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/26/2018) (ap)
April 26, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: You are directed to appear for a pretrial conference, to be held on Thursday, July 5, 2018, in Courtroom 14A, at 10:30 am, in front of the Honorable John G. Koeltl. Initial Conference set for 7/5/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (js)
April 26, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #41 AMENDED MOTION for Geoffrey Aaron Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 26, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #41 AMENDED MOTION for Geoffrey Aaron Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
April 26, 2018 Filing 41 AMENDED MOTION for Geoffrey Aaron Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Geoffrey)
April 25, 2018 Filing 40 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Russian Federation. (pne)
April 25, 2018 Filing 39 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Russian Federation, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 25, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft to RE-FILE Document No. #21 Request for Issuance of Summons, #15 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reasons: Summons can only be requested for named defendants [11, 15]; the name of the party for whom the summons is being requested is incorrect in the docket entry text #21 . Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
April 25, 2018 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to WikiLeaks. (pne)
April 25, 2018 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roger J. Stone, Jr. (pne)
April 25, 2018 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard W. Gates, III. (pne)
April 25, 2018 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (pne)
April 25, 2018 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Julian Assange. (pne)
April 25, 2018 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Mifsud. (pne)
April 25, 2018 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jared C. Kushner. (pne)
April 25, 2018 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to George Papadopoulos. (pne)
April 25, 2018 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation ("GRU"). (pne)
April 25, 2018 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Emin Araz Agalarov. (pne)
April 25, 2018 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald J. Trump, Jr. (pne)
April 25, 2018 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald J. Trump For President, Inc. (pne)
April 25, 2018 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov. (pne)
April 24, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO INTERVENE AND MOTION TO JOIN. Document filed by David Andrew Christenson, a non-party.(sc)
April 24, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #24 MOTION for Geoffrey A. Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14982301. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
April 24, 2018 Filing 24 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Geoffrey A. Graber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14982301. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CGS of DC, #2 Exhibit B - CGS of California, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Geoffrey Graber, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Geoffrey) Modified on 4/24/2018 (wb).
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #5 Motion for Joseph M. Sellers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/20/2018) (mro)
April 20, 2018 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WikiLeaks, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 20, 2018 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to the Ministry of Justice, Russian Federation, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael) Modified on 4/25/2018 (pne).
April 20, 2018 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Roger J. Stone, Jr., re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 20, 2018 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richard W. Gates, III, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 20, 2018 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr., re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 20, 2018 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Julian Assange, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 20, 2018 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Mifsud, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 20, 2018 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jefferson Beauregard Session III, Attorney General of the United States, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael) Modified on 4/25/2018 (pne).
April 20, 2018 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jared C. Kushner, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 20, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation ("GRU"), re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 20, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to George Papadopoulos, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 20, 2018 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Geoffrey S. Berman, U.S. Attorney, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael) Modified on 4/25/2018 (pne).
April 20, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Emin Araz Agalarov, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 20, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald J. Trump, Jr., re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 20, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 20, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 20, 2018 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov, Julian Assange, Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., GRU Operative Using the Pseudonym "Guccifer2.0", Richard W. Gates, III, General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation, John Does 1-10, Jared C. Kushner, Paul J. Manafort, Jr, Joseph Mifsud, George Papadopoulos, Roger J. Stone, Jr, The Russian Federation, Donald J. Trump, Jr, WikiLeaks. Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Eisenkraft to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; IF YOU WANT TO REQUEST A SUMMONS, YOU MUST ATTACH ONLY ONE PDF PER SUMMONS REQUEST ENTRY, OR YOU CAN REQUEST ONE SUMMONS FOR ALL DEFENDANTS WITH ATTACHING A RIDER WITH DEFENDANTS LISTED. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (laq)
April 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael Eisenkraft to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (laq)
April 20, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (laq)
April 20, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (laq)
April 20, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (laq)
April 20, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Joseph M. Sellers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14969145. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
April 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Joseph M. Sellers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14969145. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sellers, Joseph)
April 20, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Russian Federation, General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation ("GRU"), Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov, Emin Araz Agalarov, Joseph Mifsud, WikiLeaks, Julian Assange, Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Jr., Paul J. Manafort, Jr., Roger J. Stone, Jr., Jared C. Kushner, George Papadopoulos, Richard W. Gates, III, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, Geoffrey S. Berman, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Democratic National Committee. (Eisenkraft, Michael) Modified on 4/20/2018 (laq).
April 20, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 20, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14967553)Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Eisenkraft, Michael) Modified on 4/20/2018 (laq).
April 20, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14967553)Document filed by Democratic National Committee.(Eisenkraft, Michael) Modified on 4/20/2018 (laq).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Democratic National Committee v. The Russian Federation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Democratic National Committee
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Geoffrey A Graber
Represented By: Julia Ann Horwitz
Represented By: Alison Deich
Represented By: Eric Steven Berelovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Manafort, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WikiLeaks
Represented By: Joshua Lewis Dratel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aras Iskenerovich Agalarov
Represented By: Scott Sonny Balber
Represented By: Jonathan Christopher Cross
Represented By: Michael Paul Jones
Represented By: Pamela Kathleen Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Ellen Powers
Represented By: William D. Coglianese
Represented By: Michael A. Carvin
Represented By: James Matthew Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Gates, III
Represented By: William M. Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Papadopoulos
Represented By: Christopher Norman Lavigne
Represented By: Caroline Johnston Polisi
Represented By: Shira Lauren Feldman
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Alexander
Represented By: Eric M. Creizman
Represented By: Jeffrey Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Russian Federation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Assange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRU Operative Using the Pseudonym "Guccifer2.0"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Mifsud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger J. Stone, Jr.
Represented By: Grant Jeffrey Smith
Represented By: Robert C. Buschel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emin Araz Agalarov
Represented By: Scott Sonny Balber
Represented By: Jonathan Christopher Cross
Represented By: Michael Paul Jones
Represented By: Pamela Kathleen Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared C. Kushner
Represented By: Abbe David Lowell
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Staff of the Armed Forces of the Russian Federation ("GRU")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
Represented By: Caroline Decell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Caroline Decell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
Represented By: Caroline Decell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?