Derubbio et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Plaintiff: jessica derubbio, Zamani Davis, Kim Chang, David Cannella, Lawrence Gray, Peter Francis, John Churchill, Raymond Durant, Debra Giordano, Angela Fields, Myrta Gschaar, Michael Zinkofsky, Jacob Heber, Tommy Smith, Peter Fegan, Jeffrey Jenkins, Dorepha Forde, Jeanne Keating, June Griffin, Anthony Desperito, Lori Feely, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Kathleen A. Devlin, Beverly Harrington, Herman Halmon, Jennifer Green, Elaine Cunnea, Veronica John, Dora Murillo, Matthew Green, Ingrid Jaffe, Melrose Morris Green, Joe Green, Rebecca Loethen, Leander Jones, Catherine Fleming, April Horton, Myrna Thomas, Robert J. Harrington, Aserene Smith, Dawn Haskell, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Pamela Dixon, Gary Jones, Stephen Hyland, Daniel Frost, Dina Doany-Azzam, David Desperito, Andrea Stauter, Laurie Pater, Brian Howley, Ellen Vigeant, Charlene Cumberbatch, Patricia Jones, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Anthony Derubbio, Deborah Khublall, Robert Hofmiller, Kathryn Nesbit, David Gordenstein, Joanne Hrycak, Lisa Grouzalis, Royston Roach, Robert B. Hemenway Jr., Audrey Ades, Mary Geraghty, Allen Freeman, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Dominick Derubbio, Linda Houston, Talat Hamdani, Joseph Francis, Annete Herman, Raymond Forde, Mary Farino, Rafael Herman, Sherard Dixon, Rose Costello, Erika Lutzner, Sandra Jamerson, Jane Gyulavary, Maria Jurgens, Gary Mckinzy, Michael James, Dorolyne Forde, Richard Friedman-Fox, Teri Marshall, Itauma Ette, Shirley Foreman, Tatiana R. Gomez, Kevin Haskell, George Cueller, Dorna Forde, Rachel James, Tatiana S. Gomez, Troy Francis, Teresa Granados, Linda Hulse, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Bonnie Freiman, Stephen N. Hyland, Christine Buividas, Richard Hyun-Soo Freiman Fox, Patrick Farino, Peter Fegan, Jr., Jon R. Grabowski, Jenna Griffin, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Laurie Vigeant, Sadie Ette, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Harold Singleton, Susan Hyland, Lynn E. Cannata, Catherine Curley, Francis Houston, Frank Farino, Felicia Cappo, Dennis Devlin, Standish Halmon, Derrick A. Green, Ibrahim Doany, Brett O. Freiman, Samuel Fields, Sr., Maxima Jean-Pierre, Julie M. Geis, Norma Geraghty, Ernest James, Sharon Hafiz, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Jane M. Cristiano, Gerald Hrycak, Michael Geis, Carla Freeman, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Julie Griffin, Benjamin Edokpayi, Juanita Freeman, Lamar D. Hulse, Stefan Fields, Kerry Sharkey, Anne Marie Hartney, James Geraghty, Delroy Llewellyn, Luke Dudek, Burt A. Lewis, Joan Houston, Lisa F. Gordenstein, Carolyn Belford, Maureen Granados, William Houston, Camille Doany, Stephanie Feely, Daniel Farino, Colin Geraghty, Stephanie Houston, Stephen M. Fogel, Cheryl Hyland, Gilbert Granados, Demetrius Fields, Charles Hyland, Evelyn Griffin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Gale DiFrancisco, Stephen Geraghty, James Farino, Bebe Hafiz, Tamitha Freeman, June Jurgens, Janet Baronian, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Carolyn Halmon, John R. Eichler, Thomas Farino, Sharif Fields, Mohammad S. Hamdani, Marcus Foreman, Marian R. Hrycak, Corina Murillo, Lindsay Jurgens, Samia Doany, Charles J. Houston, Alisha Halmon, Xavier White, Carly Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Herbert Freiman, Tara McCloud Gray, Brittany Fogel, Karen Hamorsky, Caitlin Feely, Joseph Fogel, Chang Kim, Roberta B. Heber, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Joseph Gallagher, Paul Jurgens, Michael Freiman, Zeshan Hamdani, Debora Fenn, Genevieve Gyulavary, John Griffin, David Foreman, Connor Geraghty, Stuart Bernstein, John M. Griffin, Melissa Bernstein, Paul W. Jurgens, Jairo Castro, Nezam Hafiz, Sean B. Fegan, Carol Varland, Casey Devlin, Jennifer Feely Artola, Patricia Feely and Jennifer L. Howley
Defendant: The Islamic Republic of Iran and Islamic Republic of Iran
Case Number: 1:2018cv05306
Filed: June 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 128 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE served on Islamic Republic of Iran on 2/19/2020. Document filed by Jessica Derubbio..(Goldman, Jerry)
February 18, 2020 Filing 127 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (126 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN, 111 in 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN, 74 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN, 5952 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 74 in 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN, 66 in 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN) Order. It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated February 14, 2020, Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn's January 23, 2020 Report and Recommendation (the "Report"), recommending that this Court grant in part and deny in part Plaintiffs' motions; (Report, ECF No.5735, at 12), is adopted, as it pertains to Plaintiffs John Proodian, Reginald Colon, Rosa Colon, Julio Masa Lebron, George A. Cuellar, and Rebecca Sue Loethen. Plaintiffs motion for Final Judgments (ECF Nos. 4930, 4914, 4910, 4918, and 4934), are granted as they pertain to John Proodian, Reginald Colon, Rosa Colon, Julio Masa Lebron, George A. Cuellar, and Rebecca Sue Loethen. it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgmentfor solatium damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent perannum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages awards may submit in later stages applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those PlaintiffsAppearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. In favor of John Prodian against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 8,500,000.00, in favor of Reginald Colon against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 8,500,000.00, in favor of Rosa Colon against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 8,500,000.00, in favor of Julio Masa Lebron against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 8,500,000.00, in favor of George A. Cuellar against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00, and in favor of Rebecca Sue Loethen against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 12,500,000.00. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 02/18/2020) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (dt)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER re: (34 in 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN, 4930 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment, (4918 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 85 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment, (4914 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 84 in 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment: Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Judgments, (ECF Nos. 4930, 4914, 4910, 4918, and 4934), are GRANTED as they pertain to Plaintiffs John Proodian, Reginald Colon, Rosa Colon, Julio Masa Lebron, George A. Cuellar, and Rebecca Sue Loethen. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgment for solatium damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions for which this Court has not granted extensions of time for plaintiffs to object in 03 MDL 1570, (ECF Nos. 4930, 4914, and 4918), 18 Civ. 12387, (ECF No. 34), 18 Civ. 5320 (ECF No. 84), and 18 Civ. 5306 (ECF No. 85), accordingly. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/14/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (jwh) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
February 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (63 in 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN, 72 in 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN, 5930 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 124 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN, 109 in 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment, was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN(dt)
February 12, 2020 Filing 125 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jerry S. Goldman dated 02/12/2020 re: Proposed Order of Final Judgment and Exhibit A in Connection with Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 5735). Document filed by Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Roberta Agyeman, Jessica Derubbio, Matthew Rowenhorst. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN.(Goldman, Jerry)
February 12, 2020 Filing 124 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Lloyd Abel, Sr, Roberta Agyeman, Jessica Derubbio, Matthew Rowenhorst. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Goldman, Jerry) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF DeRUBBIO PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED IN EXHIBITS A AND B III: It is hereby ORDERED that service of process was effected upon the Iran Defendants in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1608(a) for sovereign defendants and 28 U.S.C. 1608(b) for agencies and instrumentalities of sovereign defendants; and it is ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in DeRubbio III, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling (or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of an individual killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in DeRubbio III, as identified in the attached Exhibit B, who are each the estate of a victim of the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit B; as further set forth herein. Motions terminated: (112 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN, 5556 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment III filed by Jessica Derubbio, jessica derubbio. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/12/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN (mro)
January 31, 2020 Filing 122 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. dated 1/31/2020 Document filed by Jessica Derubbio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
January 30, 2020 Filing 121 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn dated 1/30/2020 Document filed by Jessica Derubbio.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
January 29, 2020 Filing 120 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (5764 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 119 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN) Letter filed by Jessica Derubbio. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to replace the document at ECF No. 5735 correcting the spelling error above. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/29/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN. (ras)
January 29, 2020 Filing 119 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. dated 1/29/2020 Document filed by Jessica Derubbio.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
January 23, 2020 Filing 118 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Plaintiffs should receive solatium damages as follows: (See document.) The solatium claims for Diana Patricia Castano, Margaret Ann Williams, Christine Wilson, Katherine Wynn, Edith Otelia Harris, the Estate of Lelia Wynn, and the Estate of Dorothy Lee Coles should be DENIED under the principles established in Hoglan IV. Plaintiffs should also be awarded prejudgment interest on these damages from September 11, 2001, through the date of judgment, at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually. See ECF No. 3358, adopted by, ECF No. 3383. Plaintiffs may apply for punitive damages at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by the Court on this issue. Finally, any Rowenhorst, Agyeman, Abel, DeRubbio, and Kim Plaintiffs not appearing in this motion and who were not previously awarded damages may still submit applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards. The parties shall have fourteen days from the service of this Report and Recommendation to file written objections pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See also Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), (d) (adding three additional days when service is made under Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(C), (D), or (F)). A party may respond to another party's objections within fourteen days after being served with a copy. Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2). Such objections shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court, with courtesy copies delivered to the chambers of the Honorable George B. Daniels at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, and to any opposing parties. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b). Any requests for an extension of time for filing objections must be addressed to Judge Daniels. The failure to file these timely objections will result in a waiver of those objections for purposes of appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b); Thomas v. Arn, 474 U.S. 140 (1985). (Objections to R&R due by 2/6/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/23/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
January 16, 2020 Filing 117 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. dated 1/15/2020 Document filed by Jessica Derubbio.(Goldman, Jerry)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting (5520) Motion to Substitute Party, in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (110) Motion to Substitute Party, in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN. The individuals included on Exhibit A to the Motion shall be substituted into the DeRubbio case. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN. (ras) Modified on 1/15/2020 (ras).
January 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (115 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN, 5559 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN(dt)
January 15, 2020 Filing 115 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Jessica Derubbio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Goldman, Jerry) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 15, 2020 Filing 114 DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. in Support re: (5556 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 112 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment III .. Document filed by Jessica Derubbio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
January 15, 2020 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5556 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 112 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment III . . Document filed by Jessica Derubbio. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
January 15, 2020 Filing 112 MOTION Partial Final Judgment III . Document filed by Jessica Derubbio. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
January 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (5521 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 111 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN) Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN(dt)
January 14, 2020 Filing 111 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Jessica Derubbio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Related Document Number: [5520, 110]. (Strong, Bruce) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 14, 2020 Filing 110 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Lois Churchill, Ituama Ette, Allen Freeman, Herbert Freiman, Minor, New Party: John Churchill as Personal, Representative of the Estate of Lois, Churchill, deceased, the late sibling of John E. Eichler. Benjamin Edokpayi, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sadie Ette, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Sadie Ette. Allen Freeman and Juanita Freeman, as co-Personal Representatives of theEstate of Tamitha Freeman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Tamitha Freeman. Burt A. Lewis as Personal Representative of the Estate of Herbert Freiman, deceased, the late parent of Brett O. Freiman. Richard Hyun-Soo Freiman Fox . Document filed by Jessica Derubbio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN(Strong, Bruce)
January 10, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE of Iran Notice of Amendment re: (20 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN) Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (79 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN, 79 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN) Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, (60 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN, 60 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN) Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,,,,, (5234 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Order,,. Document filed by Gale DiFrancisco, Anthony DeRubbio, Jessica Derubbio. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
January 2, 2020 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the following documents in English and Farsi: Notice of Judgment, Order of Judgment for Liability, dated May 28, 2019; Order of Partial Final Judgment for Damages, dated August 19, 2019; Instructions for Appealing the Judgment; a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 28 U.S.C. 1391, 28 U.S.C. 1441, and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq.); and Affidavit of Translator mailed to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, c/o Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Iman Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran, ATTN: H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy R eview and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 9/11/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 8148 5856 736, as per #94 Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. (smc)
January 2, 2020 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the following documents in English and Farsi: Notice of Judgment; Order of Judgment for Liability, dated May 28, 2019; Order of Partial Final Judgment for Damages, dated September 10, 2019; Judgment, dated September 11, 2019; Instructions for Appealing the Judgment; a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 28 U.S.C. 1391, 28 U.S.C. 1441, and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq.); and Affidavit of Translator mailed to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, c/o Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Iman Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran, ATTN: H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif, by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 9/12/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 8148 5856 7444, as per #95 Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. (smc)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against Iran and on behalf of those Plaintiffs who are identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling (or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A; and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN(jwh)
November 15, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE of Iran Notice of Amendment Nunc Pro Tunc. Document filed by Jessica Derubbio. (Goldman, Jerry)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (102) Motion to Correct Judgment in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN: ORDERED that the final judgment for solatium damages entered on behalf of Kathleen Granados in the Court's August 19, 2019 Final Order of Judgment (ECF No. 4885 at Exhibit A, line 98) against the Islamic Republic of Iran is vacated; ORDERED that the final judgment for solatium damages entered on behalf of Maureen Granados in the Court's August 19, 2019 Final Order of Judgment (ECF No. 4885 at Exhibit A, line 99) against the Islamic Republic of Iran is vacated; ORDERED that the final judgment for solatium damages entered on behalf of Teresa Granados in the Court's August 19, 2019 Final Order of Judgment (ECF No. 4885 at Exhibit A, line 100) against the Islamic Republic of Iran is vacated; ORDERED that the final judgment for solatium damages entered on behalf of Maria Jurgens in the Court's August 19, 2019 Final Order of Judgment (ECF No. 4885 at Exhibit A, line 169) against the Islamic Republic of Iran is vacated; ORDERED that the final judgment for solatium damages entered on behalf of Susan Hyland in the Court's August 19, 2019 Final Order of Judgment (ECF No. 4885 at Exhibit A, line 155) against the Islamic Republic of Iran is vacated; ORDERED that the modified Exhibit A removing Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Maria Jurgens and Susan Hyland is hereby adopted; and it is hereby ORDERED that the Court's August 19, 2019 Final Order of Judgment (ECF No. 4885) remains otherwise in force and that all other final judgments awarded to the DeRubbio Plaintiffs identified in the August 19, 2019 Order docketed at ECF No. 4885 remain in effect. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/14/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN (jwh)
November 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #105 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
November 13, 2019 Filing 105 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Jessica Derubbio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) Related Document Number: #102 . (Goldman, Jerry) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
November 13, 2019 Filing 104 DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. in Support re: #102 MOTION to Correct Judgment re: #84 Judgment,,,,,,,, .. Document filed by Jessica Derubbio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Goldman, Jerry)
November 13, 2019 Filing 103 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #102 MOTION to Correct Judgment re: #84 Judgment,,,,,,,, . . Document filed by Jessica Derubbio. (Goldman, Jerry)
November 13, 2019 Filing 102 MOTION to Correct Judgment re: #84 Judgment,,,,,,,, . Document filed by Jessica Derubbio. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Goldman, Jerry)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER TO WITHDRAW BENJAMIN D. MARGO AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: It is ORDERED that Benjamin D. Margo be withdrawn as counsel for the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia in the above-referenced action. (Attorney Benjamin David Margo.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/25/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (jwh)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting (5182) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (524) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; granting (96) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; granting (95) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; granting (44) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN; granting (54) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN; granting (45) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN; granting (46) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN. Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Iran Notices of Amendment Nunc Pro Tunc, in the above-captioned matters, it is hereby; ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' motion is granted; ORDERED that Plaintiffs may file the Iran Notices of Amendment Nunc Pro Tunc, attached hereto as Exhibits A - I. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/23/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
October 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (51 in 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN, 47 in 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN, 51 in 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN, 57 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN, 98 in 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN, 49 in 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN, 527 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN, 99 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN, 5185 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt)
October 2, 2019 Filing 99 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Jessica Derubbio, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, John O'Neill, Matthew Rowenhorst. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) Related Document Number: [5182, 524, 96, 95, 44, 54, 45, 48, 46, 48]. (Goldman, Jerry) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 2, 2019 Filing 98 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (96 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN, 46 in 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN, 5182 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 95 in 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN, 45 in 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN, 54 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN, 44 in 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN, 524 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN) MOTION for Leave to File Iran Notices Of Amendment NUNC PRO TUNC . . Document filed by Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Jessica Derubbio, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, John O'Neill, Matthew Rowenhorst. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
October 2, 2019 Filing 97 DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. in Support re: (95 in 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN, 45 in 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN, 54 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN, 44 in 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN, 96 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN, 46 in 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN, 5182 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN, 524 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN) MOTION for Leave to File Iran Notices Of Amendment NUNC PRO TUNC .. Document filed by Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Jessica Derubbio, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, John O'Neill, Matthew Rowenhorst. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
October 2, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION for Leave to File Iran Notices Of Amendment NUNC PRO TUNC . Document filed by Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Jessica Derubbio, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, John O'Neill, John O'Neill, Matthew Rowenhorst. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
September 13, 2019 Filing 95 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the following documents in English and Farsi: Notice of Judgment; Order of Judgment for Liability, dated May 28, 2019; Order of Partial Final Judgment for Damages, dated September 10, 2019; Judgment, dated September 11, 2019; Instructions for Appealing the Judgment; a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 28 U.S.C. 1391, 28 U.S.C. 1441, and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq.); and Affidavit of Translator, for service on defendant ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, c/o Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Iman Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran, ATTN: H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif, on 09/12/2019, by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), by Federal Express tracking # 8148 5856 7444. (gpe)
September 12, 2019 Filing 94 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the following documents in English and Farsi: Notice of Judgment, Order of Judgment for Liability, dated May 28, 2019; Order of Partial Final Judgment for Damages, dated August 19, 2019; Instructions for Appealing the Judgment; a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 28 U.S.C. 1391, 28 U.S.C. 1441, and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq.); and Affidavit of Translator, for service on defendant ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, c/o Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Iman Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran, ATTN: H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif on 09/11/2019 by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), by Federal Express tracking # 8148 5856 7363. (gpe)
September 11, 2019 Filing 93 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (5123 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 92 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN) Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated September 10, 2019, that Plaintiffs' motion for partial final judgment, (ECF No. 4918) is granted in part and denied in part; this Court's determination on solatium damages and prejudgment interest for all non-immediate-family member claimants shall be decided by separate opinions because the specific factual circumstances of the non-immediate family members require further analysis; Final judgment is entered on behalf of all Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A against the Islamic Republic of Iran (the "DeRubbio II Plaintiffs"), with the exception of George A. Cuellar and Rebecca Loethen; and it is ORDERED that all other DeRubbio II Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded solatium damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it isORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated as a rate of 4.96% per annum; all interest compounded over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiff not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards that will be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings;(1) Timothy Geraghty in the amount of $4,250,000, plus prejudgment interest at 4.96% per annum compounded annually over the same period;(2) Dora Murillo in the amount of $4,250,000.00, plus prejudgment interest at 4.96% per annum compounded annually over the same period;(3) Gary McKinzy in the amount of $12,500,000.00, plus prejudgment interest at 4.96% per annum compounded annually over the same period;(4) Mohammed Hamdani in the amount of $4,250,000.00, plus prejudgment interest at 4.96% per annum compounded annually over the same period;(5) Cheryl Hyland in the amount of $4,2500,000.00, plus prejudgment interest at 4.96% per annum compounded annually over the same period;(6) Jeffrey Jenkins in the amount of $4,250,000.00, plus prejudgment interest at 4.96% per annum compounded annually over the same period. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 09/11/2019) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN(dt)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part (4918) Motion in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting in part and denying in part (85) Motion in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN: Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Final Judgement, (ECF No. 4918), is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. This Court's determination on solatium damages and prejudgment interest for all non-immediate-family-member claimants shall be decided by separate opinions because the specific factual circumstances of the non-immediate family members require further analysis. Final judgment is entered on behalf of all Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A against the Islamic Republic of Iran (the "DeRubbio II Plaintiffs"), with the exception of George A. Cuellar and Rebecca Loethen; and it is ORDERED that all other DeRubbio II Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded solatium damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96% per annum; all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards that will be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions in 03 md 1570, (ECF No. 4918), and 18 Civ. 5306, (ECF No. 85), accordingly. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/10/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN (jwh) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. Modified on 9/10/2019 (jwh).
August 27, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samantha Emily Smith on behalf of C. O'Neill, Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Sr, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, David DeConto, Marie DeConto LeBlanc, Jessica Derubbio, Joseph Deuel, Richard Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr., Estate of of John P. O'Neill, Sr., Allison Garger, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Desiree Hemenway, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, Kristian Kincaid, Karyl Kincaid-Noel, Stephanie Lang, Queen Mercer, Deirdre Moody, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Horace Morris, Michael Murray, Michael Murray, C. O'Neill, C. O'Neill, C. O'Neill, C. I. O'Neill, John O'Neill, Ana Ortiz, Berta Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Deborah Rooney, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Barbara Spence, Edward Stackpole, Michael Stackpole, Jack Zelmanowitz. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Smith, Samantha)
August 23, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vianny Maria Pichardo on behalf of C. O'Neill, Erik Aamoth, Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Jr, Lloyd Abel, Sr, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, David DeConto, Jessica Derubbio, Joseph Deuel, Joseph Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr., Allison Garger, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, Kristian Kincaid, Stephanie Lang, Jackie Mercer, Queen Mercer, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Horace Morris, Michael Murray, Michael Murray, Timothy Murray, C. O'Neill, C. O'Neill, C. I. O'Neill, J. O'Neill, Ana Ortiz, Mario Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Deborah Rooney, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Barbara Spence, Shannon Spence, Edward Stackpole, Michael Stackpole, Jack Zelmanowitz. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Pichardo, Vianny)
August 21, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Wah on behalf of Erik Aamoth, Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Jr, Lloyd Abel, Sr, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, Raymond DeConto, Jessica Derubbio, Joseph Deuel, Joseph Deuel, Richard Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr., Allison Garger, Carly Gordenstein, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Desiree Hemenway, Marinella Hemenway, Robert Hemenway, Robert Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, Kristian Kincaid, Stephanie Lang, Queen Mercer, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Horace Morris, Michael Murray, Michael Murray, C. O'Neill, C. O'Neill, C. O'Neill, C. I. O'Neill, Ana Ortiz, Berta Perez, Mario Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Deborah Rooney, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Barbara Spence, Edward Stackpole, Michael Stackpole, Jack Zelmanowitz. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Wah, Stephen)
August 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (4921 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 88 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN(ad)
August 20, 2019 Filing 88 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Jessica Derubbio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Goldman, Jerry) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 20, 2019 Filing 87 DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. in Support re: (4918 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 85 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment .. Document filed by Jessica Derubbio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
August 20, 2019 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (4918 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 85 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment . . Document filed by Jessica Derubbio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
August 20, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION Partial Final Judgment . Document filed by Jessica Derubbio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT: Upon consideration of the evidence and arguments submitted by Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A to this Order, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling (or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of a victim killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, and the Judgment by Default for liability only against the Islamic Republic of Iran, ("Iran") entered on May 28, 2019 (03-md-1570, ECF No. 4563), together with the entire record in this case, it is hereby; ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against Iran and on behalf of those Plaintiffs who are identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling (or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A may submit an application for punitive damages, economic damages, or other damages (to the extent such awards have not previously been ordered) at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue; and it is ORDERED that the remaining Plaintiffs in Jessica DeRubbio, et al. v. Islamic Republic of Iran, No. 1:18-cv-05306 (GBD) (SN) not appearing on Exhibit A, may submit in later stages applications for damages awards, and to the extent such plaintiffs are similarly situated to those appearing on Exhibit A, the applications will be approved consistent with those approved herein for the Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN(mro)
August 13, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samantha Emily Smith on behalf of Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Smith, Samantha)
August 13, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vianny Maria Pichardo on behalf of Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Pichardo, Vianny)
August 12, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Wah on behalf of Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Wah, Stephen)
August 12, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey E Glen on behalf of Gordon Aamoth, Peter Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, David DeConto, Jessica Derubbio, Richard Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr., Allison Garger, David Gordenstein, Arthur Harris, Desiree Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, Kristian Kincaid, Stephanie Lang, Queen Mercer, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Dahlia Morris, Michael Murray, Ana Ortiz, Mario Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Shannon Spence, Michael Stackpole, Jack Zelmanowitz. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Glen, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting (4713) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (70) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 08/09/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN. (ras)
August 6, 2019 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (4720 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment ., (73 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment . . Document filed by Jessica Derubbio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
August 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. #77 Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
August 2, 2019 Filing 77 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Goldman, Jerry) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jerry Goldman to RE-FILE Document #76 Proposed Order. Use the event type proposed orders, proposed judgment. The title of the document needs to be labeled as a judgment, please remove the word Order. (km)
August 1, 2019 Filing 76 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. Related Document Number: [73,74,75]. (Goldman, Jerry) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 8/2/2019 (km).
August 1, 2019 Filing 75 DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. in Support re: #73 MOTION Partial Final Judgment .. Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit A)(Goldman, Jerry)
August 1, 2019 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #73 MOTION Partial Final Judgment . . Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Goldman, Jerry)
August 1, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION Partial Final Judgment . Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldman, Jerry)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #72 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
July 31, 2019 Filing 72 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. Related Document Number: [70, 71]. (Goldman, Jerry) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 31, 2019 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #70 MOTION to Amend/Correct . . Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Goldman, Jerry)
July 31, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION to Amend/Correct . Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldman, Jerry)
July 25, 2019 Filing 69 LETTERS ROGATORY (Doc. #4702) ISSUED July 25, 2019, as to Cathy Hawara Assistant Commissioner, Appeal Canada Rvenue Agency, Connaught Building, 555 MacKenzie Avenue, 7the Floor, Ottawa, Ontario in Canada. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Mamdouh Mahmud Salim for October 8, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 07/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt) Modified on 7/15/2019 (dt). Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt). Picked up on July 16, 2019, by Jerry Goldman's Office
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Wadith elHage for October 7, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 07/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt) Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt). Picked up on July 16, 2019, by Jerry Goldman's Office
May 28, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number (4561) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(lb)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting (4508) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (61) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN. It is hereby; ORDERED that the DeRubbio Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment by Default Against the Islamic Republic of Iran is GRANTED and final judgment on liability is entered in favor of the DeRubbio Plaintiffs in Jessica DeRubbio, et al. v. Islamic Republic of Iran, Case Number: 1: 18-cv-05306 (GBD) (SN) and against the Islamic Republic of Iran; ORDERED that the DeRubbio Plaintiffs are hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn to resolve any remaining issues, including but not limited to damages, both compensatory and punitive. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/28/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN (ks) Modified on 5/29/2019 (ks).
May 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #63 Proposed Order, was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
May 3, 2019 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion For Entry Of Default Judgment Against The Islamic Republic Of Iran As To Liability Only; Memorandum of Law In Support Of Motion For Entry Of Default Judgment Against The Islamic Republic Of Iran Only As To Liability On Behalf Of All DeRubbio Plaintiffs; and Proposed Order of Judgment served on Islamic Republic Of Iran on 05/03/2019. Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Goldman, Jerry)
May 3, 2019 Filing 63 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. Related Document Number: [61, 62]. (Goldman, Jerry) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 3, 2019 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #61 MOTION for Default Judgment as to . . Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Goldman, Jerry)
May 3, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for Default Judgment as to . Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldman, Jerry)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting (4441) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN. On March 15, 2019, Plaintiffs filed a motion for leave to amend. Plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED. The corrections identified below are deemed made to Plaintiff's Complaint and Notice of Amendments. Because the alterations are insubstantial - and because Plaintiffs have properly served Defendant in accordance with the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and obtained a Certificate of Default - Plaintiffs are not required to serve the amended pleadings. See Shoham v. Islamic Republic of Iran, 922 F. Supp. 2d 44, 47 (D.D.C. 2013) (citations omitted). The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF No. 4441 (03-MDL-01570) and ECF No. 57 (18-CV-05306). (See document.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 04/04/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN. (ras)
March 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #59 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
March 15, 2019 Filing 59 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. Related Document Number: #57 . (Goldman, Jerry) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
March 15, 2019 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #57 MOTION to Amend/Correct . . Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Goldman, Jerry)
March 15, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Amend/Correct . Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldman, Jerry)
March 1, 2019 Filing 56 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (6 in 1:18-cv-11834-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom., (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy B. Fleming, #2 Exhibit Havlish Public Comments on USVSST Fund interpretations 6.29.16)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
January 18, 2019 Filing 55 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Islamic Republic of Iran, issued on January 18, 2019. (dt)
January 18, 2019 Filing 54 AFFIDAVIT of Jerry S. Goldman in Support re: #53 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Goldman, Jerry)
January 18, 2019 Filing 53 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Goldman, Jerry) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
January 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Jerry Goldman regarding Document No. #51 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Please refer to ECF Rule 16.1. The request to enter default is no longer needed. Re-file the proposed clerk's certificate as one entry, then file the affidavit in support as a separate entry. (Filed under other answers, affidavit in support of a non-motion). (km)
January 17, 2019 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT of Jerry S. Goldman in Support re: #51 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Goldman, Jerry)
January 17, 2019 Filing 51 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Goldman, Jerry) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 1/18/2019 (km).
January 4, 2019 Filing 50 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/4/2019 re: Briefing Schedule on Havlish-Hoglan Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Havlish-Hoglan Letter to Judge Netburn, #2 Exhibit B - PECs Letter to Judge Netburn)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
December 28, 2018 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Summons, Complaint, First Notice of Amendment, Second Notice of Amendment, Third Notice of Amendment, Fourth Notice of Amendment and Notice of Suit, and translations of each. served on Islamic Republic of Iran on September 26, 2018. Service was accepted by Brianna E. Powers. Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Goldman, Jerry)
December 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Jerry Goldman. File the proof of service in the case using an applicable event found under the event list Service of Process. RE-FILE Document No. #47 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the proposed clerk's certificate of default lists the wrong name(s) for the party(ies) who was/were served; the proof of service of the pleading was not filed; Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders -select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF that - lists the correct filed date of the complaint, lists the correct name(s) of the party(ies) who was/were served, lists the correct date the party(ies) was/were served, lists the correct filed date of the proof of service, then Re-file the Affidavit in Support of the Clerk's Certificate, under Other Answers, Affidavit in Support of a Non-Motion. (dt)
December 26, 2018 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT of Arthur R. Armstrong in Support re: #47 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Armstrong, Arthur)
December 26, 2018 Filing 47 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Goldman, Jerry) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 12/27/2018 (dt).
December 21, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Arthur Armstrong. RE-FILE Document No. #45 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The clerk's certificate needs to be signed by the Deputy Clerk, not the Clerk. Please correct and re-file document. (km)
December 21, 2018 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT of Arthur R. Armstrong, ESQ. in Support re: #45 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Armstrong, Arthur)
December 21, 2018 Filing 45 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Armstrong, Arthur) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 12/21/2018 (km).
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying (479) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (833) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4287) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (500) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; denying (465) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (675) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; denying (586) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; denying (641) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (595) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (405) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (527) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; denying (367) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; denying (623) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (130) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; denying (285) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; denying (1003) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; denying (48) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; denying (408) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; denying (133) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (111) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; denying (75) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (104) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (114) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (72) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (79) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (67) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (65) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (47) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (32) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; denying (44) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; denying (18) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; denying (11) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; denying (402) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; denying (485) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; denying (1040) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (398) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; denying (404) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. Application DENIED. A request to defer the Court's written decision is not the proper way to bring additional relevant information to the Court's attention. Saudi Arabia's request to file a redacted version of its December 18, 2018 letter is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
December 20, 2018 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Return Date set for 1/3/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Report and Recommendation, #3 Exhibit List of Judgments, #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics 2018, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (12 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Return Date set for 1/2/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Mag. J. Report and Recommendation 7/12/16, #3 Exhibit List of Iran Judgments (not exhaustive), #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 18, 2018 Filing 39 LETTER MOTION for Discovery as filed under seal Docket No. 4280 on December 13, 2018 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J Maloney, III dated 12-18-2018. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Maloney, Andrew)
November 26, 2018 Filing 38 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Complaint in long form or in altered short form addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Timothy B. Fleming dated 11/26/2018. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
November 7, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arthur R. Armstrong on behalf of Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Armstrong, Arthur)
November 5, 2018 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the Summons, Complaint deemed filed on June 15, 2018, First Notice of Amendment, Second Notice of Amendment, Third Notice of Amendment, Fourth Notice of Amendment, Notice of Suit, Affidavit of Translator (a long with translations of the above documents), Civil Cover Sheet mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran, c/o Permanent Mission of Iran to the United Nations, 622 Third Avenue, New York, New York 10007 to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 07/19/2018 by Federal Express tracking # 812077858611, as per #24 Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. (smc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Elliot Strong on behalf of Audrey Ades, Jennifer Feely Artola, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Melissa Bernstein, Stuart Bernstein, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Christine Buividas, Lynn E. Cannata, David Cannella, Felicia Cappo, Jairo Castro, John Churchill, Rose Costello, Jane M. Cristiano, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Casey Devlin, Dennis Devlin, Kathleen A. Devlin, Kathleen E. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Camille Doany, Ibrahim Doany, Samia Doany, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, John R. Eichler, Itauma Ette, Daniel Farino, Frank Farino, James Farino, Mary Farino, Patrick Farino, Caitlin Feely, Lori Feely, Patricia Feely, Stephanie Feely, Peter Fegan, Peter Fegan, Jr, Debora Fenn, Angela Fields, Demetrius Fields, Sharaia Fields, Sharif Fields, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Catherine Fleming, Brittany Fogel, David Fogel, Joseph Fogel, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, David Foreman, Marcus Foreman, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Carla Freeman, Juanita Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Herbert Freiman, Michael Freiman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Joseph Gallagher, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Colin Geraghty, Colleen Geraghty, Connor Geraghty, James Geraghty, Mary Geraghty, Norma Geraghty, Stephen Geraghty, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Debra Giordano, Tatiana S. Gomez, Tatiana R. Gomez, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Samantha Gordenstein, Kathleen Granados, Maureen Granados, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, Evelyn Griffin, Jenna Griffin, John Griffin, Julie Griffin, June Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Genevieve Gyulavary, Jane Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Sharon Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Herman Halmon, Standish Halmon, Mohammed Hamdani, Talat Hamdani, Zeshan Hamdani, Karen Hamorsky, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Anne Marie Hartney, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Francis Houston, Joan Houston, Linda Houston, Stephanie Houston, William Houston, Brian Howley, Gerald Hrycak, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Charles Hyland, Cheryl Hyland, Stephen Hyland, Susan Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, June Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Maria Jurgens, Paul Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Delroy Llewellyn, Rebecca Loethen, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Corina Murillo, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Kerry Sharkey, Harold Singleton, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Carol Varland, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Vigeant, Xavier White, Michael Zinkofsky. (Strong, Bruce)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (462 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN) Letter; (35 in 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN) Letter; (33 in 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN) Letter; (497 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN) Letter; (34 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN) Letter; (20 in 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN) Letter; (35 in 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN) Letter; (670 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN) Letter; (34 in 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN) Letter. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/4/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(jwh)
October 1, 2018 Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jerry S. Goldman dated 10/1/18 re: withdrawl of attorney. Document filed by Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio.(Goldman, Jerry)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 OPINION AND ORDER re: (3742 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' October 2017 motion for sanctions (ECF No. 3742) is DENIED. By September 28, 2018, Jelaidan is ORDERED to file a sworn declaration with the Court providing detailed responses to the questions listed above. In addition, a conference is scheduled for October 12, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 110, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. McMahon and the relevant members of the PECs are ORDERED to appear at the conference in person. The parties should be prepared to discuss the PECs' May 2018 motion for sanctions and McMahon's motion to withdraw. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3742. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/30/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION AND ORDER re: (4064 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (4043) Memorandum & Opinion, filed by Abdullah Omar Naseef, Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki, Adnan Basha, Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid. The Charity Officials' motion for reconsideration is DENIED. In addition, Mr. Alan Kabat, the Charity Officials' attorneys from Lewis Baach Kaufmann Middlemiss PLLC, and the appropriate representatives from the PECs are ORDERED to appear in person at the discovery conference scheduled for October 12, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 110, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The Court intends to discuss why Mr. Kabat made representations on behalf of Al-Turki and Naseef during periods of time when he was not in communication with those clients. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 4064. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/30/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION AND ORDER re: (3910 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Defendants, World Assembly of Muslim Youth-Saudi Arabia and World Assembly of Muslim Youth-International to to produce responsive documents pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(a), filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within 7 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to provide the PECs with a complete list of all of its branch offices from 1992 until 2002. Within 14 days of this Opinion and Order, the PECs are directed to provide WAMY with a list of no more than 20 branch offices that the PECs believe are most relevant to their claims. Within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to conduct a more thorough search for documents located in the 20 branch offices that the PECs identify and to produce any additional relevant documents. In addition, within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to search for and produce the following: all documents responsive to the PECs' fourth set of document requests; all reports, meeting minutes, and other documents from WAMY's governing bodies, boards, and committees; WAMY's annual reports for 1992, 1993, and 1995; all documents relating to WAMY's relationship with the Saudi government, Saudi ministries, and Saudi embassies; all documents relating to the Benevolence International Foundation; all records regarding WAMY's relationship with or financial support for Hamas, Fatah, and the Palestinian Islamic Jihad; and unredacted versions of all documents that WAMY has previously produced in redacted form (with the exception of any documents listed on a privilege log). Finally, within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to produce a sworn declaration describing in detail its efforts to locate: additional documents in its branch offices; all reports, meeting minutes, and other documents from WAMY's governing bodies, boards, and committees; documents relating to WAMY's relationship with the Saudi government; documents relating to the Benevolence International Foundation; and documents regarding WAMY's relationship with or financial support for Hamas, Fatah, and the Palestinian Islamic Jihad The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3910. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/29/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying (817) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4077) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (450) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (626) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (579) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (392) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (607) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (50) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (62) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (91) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (90) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (90) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (90) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (76) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (84) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (84) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (56) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (53) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (54) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (33) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (46) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (36) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (30) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (29) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (1024) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (391) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. The Kingdom's motion to supplement the protective order is DENIED. The Court will not adopt the procedures the Kingdom has proposed. Instead, the parties are directed to comply with the existing protective order, ECF No. 1900, and the Court's Individual Practices when they wish to file any information with the Court that has been designated as confidential. The Court's temporary order prohibiting parties from filing any documents on the docket that have been designated as confidential by the Kingdom (ECF No. 4079) is VACATED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 4077. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 OPINION AND ORDER re: (3822 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Sanctions, filed by Plaintiffs PI Executive Committee, Plaintiffs Executive Committees, (3827 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Muslim World League and International Islamic Relief Organization to Produce Responsive Documents, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' motion for sanctions (ECF No. 3822) is DENIED as untimely. In addition, the PECs' motion to compel (ECF No. 3827) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, MWL and IIRO are ORDERED to search all of the branch offices that they have not already searched and produce any banking records from those offices and any documents falling within the categories identified in the Court's April 12, 2011 Order. MWL and IIRO are not required to search for any other documents at this time. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 3822 and 3827. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPINION AND ORDER re: (872 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 3823 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Yasin Kadi to to produce documents, filed by Kathleen Ashton, (3830 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Yasin Kadi to Document Production, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, Kadi is ORDERED to search for and produce the two reports discussed above that were prepared in anticipation of Rowad's liquidation and the 11 documents discussed above regarding Saudi Arabia's investigations of Kadi. If he is unable to locate or obtain all of these reports and documents, Kadi is ORDERED to produce a sworn declaration within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order that describes in detail his efforts to locate the reports and documents. Kadi is not required to produce any other documents at this time. In addition, within 30 days of this Opinion and Order, the parties are directed to meet and confer and make good faith efforts to resolve the disputes regarding Kadi's privilege log. Finally, the PECs' request for attorneys' fees is treated as withdrawn, and Kadi's request for attorneys' fees is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 3823, 3830 in the MDL and ECF No. 872 in 02-CV-6977. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (4073) Letter Motion for Discovery; denying (4074) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. The motions for protective orders filed by Al-Buthe, Al-Obaid, Al-Turki, and Basha are DENIED, and Naseef's motion for a protective order is DENIED as moot. In addition, Naseef is ORDERED to file a letter within 60 days of the date of this Order and every 60 days thereafter updating the Court on the status of his medical conditions and ability to participate in this action. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 4073 and 4074. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/16/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 8/27/2018, Doc. #4125 in case 1:03-md-1570. ORDER: No party shall publicly file any document on the docket designated as Confidential by the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia ("KSA") while the Court considers KSA's letter motion dated July 31, 2018. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees may respond to KSA's letter motion by August 8, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/1/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras) Modified on 8/28/2018 (ras).
July 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/3/2018. Replies due by 8/10/2018. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: On July 20, 2018, Defendants Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid, Abdullah Mahsen Al-Turki, Adnan Basha, and Abdullah Omar Naseef moved the Court to reconsider a portion of its July 6, 2018 Opinion and Order. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees may file a response to the motion by August 3, 2018. The defendants may file a reply by August 10, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/23/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
July 20, 2018 Filing 24 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Summons, Complaint deemed filed on June 15, 2018, First Notice of Amendment, Second Notice of Amendment, Third Notice of Amendment, Fourth Notice of Amendment, Notice of Suit, Affidavit of Translator (a long with translations of the above documents), Civil Cover Sheet mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran, c/o Permanent Mission of Iran to the United Nations, 622 Third Avenue, New York, New York 10007 on July 19, 2018 by Federal Express tracking # 812077858611, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jca) Modified on 7/20/2018 (jca).
July 20, 2018 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for Summons, Complaint deemed filed on June 15, 2018, First Notice of Amendment, Second Notice of Amendment, Third Notice of Amendment, Fourth Notice of Amendment, Notice of Suit, Affidavit of Translator (a long with translations of the above documents), Civil Cover Sheet mailed to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Iman Khomeini Tehran, Iran on June 29, 2018 by DHL tracking # 7152376475, as per #21 Clerk Certificate of Mailing,,. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. (jca)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Superseded by Judge's Order dated 10/28/2019, Doc. #5234 in case 1:03-md-1570. AMENDED ORDER APPROVING NOTICES TO CONFORM, SHORT FORM COMPLAINTS, AND NOTICES OF AMENDMENT: The Court has previously issued several orders approving forms and setting procedures for the filing of new claims against the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia ("Saudi Arabia") and the Islamic Republic of Iran ("Iran"). ECF Nos. 3543, 3982, 4010. Because of the piecemeal manner in which the various types of new claims have been addressed, the applicable forms and procedures have become convoluted and inconsistent. In addition, the plaintiffs have sought to find ways of adding more plaintiffs to a single case than the Court intended by utilizing a combination of short form complaints and notices of amendment. The Court is attempting to manage the influx of new cases and claims in the most efficient and organized manner possible. To that end, the Court will now establish new procedures governing all newly filed claims against Iran and Saudi Arabia. This Amended Order supersedes ECF Nos. 3543, 3982, and 4010 in their entirety. The parties are directed to adhere to both the letter and spirit of these procedures. In addition, any plaintiff wishing to withdraw from the case must seek leave from the Court to dismiss his or her claims in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Local Civil Rules, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/10/2018) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(jwh) (Main Document 4045 replaced on 12/12/2018) (ras). Modified on 11/4/2019 (ras).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION AND ORDER re: (546 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN, 987 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 3748 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 774 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 571 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN, 850 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 630 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN, 582 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN) MOTION for Sanctions - Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Sanctions as to Charity Official Defendants Abdullah Omar Naseef, Abdullah Bin Saleh Al Obaid, Abdullah Mahsen Al Turki, Adnan Basha, and Soliman Al-Buthe. filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. For the foregoing reasons, the PECs' motion for sanctions is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants Al-Obaid, Al-Turki, Basha, and Naseef are precluded from offering any testimony or further evidence, other than such evidence that has been produced as of the date of this Opinion and Order, to rebut admissible evidence offered by a party to establish these defendants' whereabouts on a particular date. In addition, Defendants Al-Buthe, Al-Turki, Basha, and Naseef are ORDERED to produce certifications that fully comply with the Courts orders within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order. The certifications from Al-Turki, Basha, and Naseef must describe the specific medical issues that have prevented them from fulfilling their discovery obligations in a timely manner, and the certifications from Al-Turki and Naseef must indicate whether they are continuing to participate in this litigation. In the alternative, if Al-Turki, Basha, or Naseef is incapacitated, that defendant may produce a competent sworn or affirmed certification from a qualified treating physician identifying the specific medical issues that have prevented the defendant from fulfilling his discovery obligations. If defense counsel is unable to contact Al-Turki and Naseef, counsel must file a letter with the Court within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order describing his efforts to contact his clients and indicating when he last had contact with them. The Court will then consider whether a default should be entered against them. If the Charity Officials remain noncompliant with the Court's orders, the Court may impose additional sanctions and may order them to show cause why they should not be held in contempt. Finally, the Court will require the Charity Officials to pay the reasonable attorneys' fees and costs that the PECs incurred in bringing their motion for sanctions. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer and make good faith efforts to reach agreement on the reasonable attorneys' fees and costs. Within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, the parties shall file a joint status letter indicating whether they have agreed upon the attorneys' fees and costs that should be imposed. If the parties have not reached agreement, the status letter should propose a reasonable schedule for briefing on the amount of the attorneys' fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3748. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/6/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ne)
July 2, 2018 Filing 21 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons, Complaint deemed filed on June 15, 2018, First Notice of Amendment, Second Notice of Amendment, Third Notice of Amendment, Fourth Notice of Amendment, Notice of Suit, Affidavit of Translator (along with translations of the above documents), Civil Cover Sheet mailed to Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Iman Khomeini, Tehran, Iran ATTN: Mohammad Javad Zarif on 06/29/2018 by DHL tracking # 71 5237 4876, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (smc) Modified on 7/9/2018 (smc). (Main Document 21 replaced on 7/9/2018) (smc).
June 26, 2018 Filing 20 Amended as per Judge Netburn's Order dated 04/04/2019 (ECF No. 60.) FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #17 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,, #18 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, #19 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #6 Complaint,,,,,, against Islamic Republic of Iran with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Troy Francis, Kevin Haskell, David Cannella, Gary Jones, Lori Feely, Sharif Fields, Mary Farino, Ingrid Jaffe, Myrna Thomas, Brittany Fogel, Linda Houston, Myrta Gschaar, Casey Devlin, Angela Fields, Carla Freeman, Joe Green, Anne Marie Hartney, Peter Francis, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Melissa Bernstein, Kathleen E. Devlin, George Cueller, John Griffin, David Foreman, Teresa Granados, Connor Geraghty, Raymond Durant, Samia Doany, Debora Fenn, Rachel James, Joseph Fogel, Patricia Feely, Itauma Ette, Julie Griffin, Carly Gordenstein, Robert Hofmiller, Matthew Green, Kathryn Nesbit, Dominick Derubbio, Corina Murillo, Patricia Jones, Tommy Smith, James Farino, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Sandra Jamerson, Stephen Hyland, John Churchill, Royston Roach, Linda Hulse, Ibrahim Doany, Jeffrey Jenkins, Dorepha Forde, Veronica John, Dawn Haskell, Robert J. Harrington, James Geraghty, Jane M. Cristiano, Sharaia Fields, Felicia Cappo, Daniel Farino, Jenna Griffin, June Griffin, Joseph Gallagher, Raymond Forde, Dora Murillo, David Fogel, Melrose Morris Green, Stephen Geraghty, Gary Mckinzy, Tatiana S. Gomez, Colin Geraghty, Dina Doany-Azzam, Lynn E. Cannata, Richard Friedman-Fox, Annete Herman, David Desperito, Stefan Fields, Norma Geraghty, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Laurie Vigeant, Ellen Vigeant, Sharon Hafiz, Laurie Pater, Stuart Bernstein, Kathleen A. Devlin, Caitlin Feely, Dorolyne Forde, Joanne Hrycak, Patrick Farino, Samantha Gordenstein, Jennifer Feely Artola, Deborah Khublall, Marcus Foreman, Michael Geis, Standish Halmon, Jacob Heber, Pamela Dixon, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Demetrius Fields, Evelyn Griffin, Chang Kim, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, Jennifer Green, Camille Doany, Maria Jurgens, Alisha Halmon, Michael James, Stephanie Feely, Zeshan Hamdani, Michael Freiman, Peter Fegan, Jr, Colleen Geraghty, Rose Costello, Carol Varland, April Horton, Mary Geraghty, Juanita Freeman, Rafael Herman, Peter Fegan, Genevieve Gyulavary, Janet Baronian, Jane Gyulavary, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Jessica Derubbio, Bonnie Freiman, Lisa Grouzalis, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Lawrence Gray, Herbert Freiman, Joseph Francis, Herman Halmon, Frank Farino, Samuel Fields, Jr, John R. Eichler, Teri Marshall, Delroy Llewellyn, Dorna Forde, Carolyn Belford, Leander Jones, Shirley Foreman, Rebecca Loethen, Jeanne Keating, David Gordenstein, Talat Hamdani, Xavier White, Dennis Devlin, Bebe Hafiz, Maureen Granados, Karen Hamorsky, Brian Howley, Michael Zinkofsky, Sherard Dixon, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Debra Giordano, Tatiana R. Gomez, Andrea Stauter, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Anthony Derubbio, Audrey Ades, Aserene Smith, Catherine Fleming, Daniel Frost, Kerry Sharkey, Anthony Desperito, Allen Freeman, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Kathleen Granados, Beverly Harrington, Erika Lutzner, Mohammed Hamdani, Catherine Patricia Hardy, Joan Houston, Robyn Bernstein Donati, Susan Hyland, Jairo Castro, Christine Buividas, June Jurgens, Stephanie Houston, Francis Houston, Cheryl Hyland, Charles Hyland, Paul Jurgens, Lindsay Jurgens, Gerald Hrycak, William Houston, Harold Singleton. Related document: #17 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,, #18 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, #19 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #6 Complaint,,,,,,.(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 4/8/2019 (ras).
June 26, 2018 Filing 19 Amended as per Judge Netburn's Order dated 04/04/2019 (ECF No. 60.) THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #17 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,, #18 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, #6 Complaint,,,,,, against Islamic Republic of Iran with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Troy Francis, Kevin Haskell, David Cannella, Gary Jones, Lori Feely, Sharif Fields, Mary Farino, Ingrid Jaffe, Myrna Thomas, Brittany Fogel, Linda Houston, Myrta Gschaar, Casey Devlin, Angela Fields, Carla Freeman, Joe Green, Anne Marie Hartney, Peter Francis, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Kathleen E. Devlin, George Cueller, David Foreman, Teresa Granados, Raymond Durant, Samia Doany, Rachel James, Joseph Fogel, Patricia Feely, Itauma Ette, Robert Hofmiller, Matthew Green, Kathryn Nesbit, Dominick Derubbio, Patricia Jones, Tommy Smith, James Farino, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Sandra Jamerson, Stephen Hyland, John Churchill, Royston Roach, Linda Hulse, Ibrahim Doany, Jeffrey Jenkins, Dorepha Forde, Veronica John, Dawn Haskell, Robert J. Harrington, Jane M. Cristiano, Sharaia Fields, Felicia Cappo, Daniel Farino, June Griffin, Joseph Gallagher, Raymond Forde, Dora Murillo, David Fogel, Melrose Morris Green, Stephen Geraghty, Gary Mckinzy, Tatiana S. Gomez, Dina Doany-Azzam, Lynn E. Cannata, Richard Friedman-Fox, Annete Herman, David Desperito, Stefan Fields, Norma Geraghty, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Laurie Vigeant, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Pater, Kathleen A. Devlin, Caitlin Feely, Dorolyne Forde, Patrick Farino, Joanne Hrycak, Jennifer Feely Artola, Deborah Khublall, Marcus Foreman, Michael Geis, Jacob Heber, Pamela Dixon, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Demetrius Fields, Chang Kim, Jennifer Green, Camille Doany, Maria Jurgens, Stephanie Feely, Michael James, Michael Freiman, Peter Fegan, Jr, Colleen Geraghty, Rose Costello, Carol Varland, Mary Geraghty, April Horton, Juanita Freeman, Rafael Herman, Peter Fegan, Janet Baronian, Jane Gyulavary, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Jessica Derubbio, Bonnie Freiman, Lisa Grouzalis, Lawrence Gray, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Herbert Freiman, Joseph Francis, Herman Halmon, Frank Farino, Samuel Fields, Jr, John R. Eichler, Teri Marshall, Dorna Forde, Carolyn Belford, Shirley Foreman, Leander Jones, Rebecca Loethen, David Gordenstein, Jeanne Keating, Talat Hamdani, Xavier White, Dennis Devlin, Karen Hamorsky, Brian Howley, Michael Zinkofsky, Sherard Dixon, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Debra Giordano, Tatiana R. Gomez, Andrea Stauter, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Anthony Derubbio, Audrey Ades, Aserene Smith, Catherine Fleming, Daniel Frost, Kerry Sharkey, Anthony Desperito, Allen Freeman, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Beverly Harrington, Erika Lutzner, Debora Fenn, Corina Murillo, Stuart Bernstein, Colin Geraghty, Zeshan Hamdani, Sharon Hafiz, Maureen Granados, Julie Griffin, Carly Gordenstein, Genevieve Gyulavary, John Griffin, Melissa Bernstein, Bebe Hafiz, Alisha Halmon, Maureen Geraghty-Perez, Mohammed Hamdani, Connor Geraghty, Delroy Llewellyn, Kathleen Granados, Standish Halmon, Jenna Griffin, Evelyn Griffin, Dorothy Fenn Grodberg, James Geraghty, Samantha Gordenstein. Related document: #17 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,, #18 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, #6 Complaint,,,,,,.(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 4/8/2019 (ras).
June 26, 2018 Filing 18 Amended as per Judge Netburn's Order dated 04/04/2019 (ECF No. 60.) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #17 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,, #6 Complaint,,,,,, against Islamic Republic of Iran with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Troy Francis, Kevin Haskell, David Cannella, Gary Jones, Lori Feely, Sharif Fields, Mary Farino, Ingrid Jaffe, Myrna Thomas, Linda Houston, Myrta Gschaar, Casey Devlin, Angela Fields, Joe Green, Anne Marie Hartney, Peter Francis, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Kathleen E. Devlin, George Cueller, Teresa Granados, Raymond Durant, Samia Doany, Rachel James, Patricia Feely, Itauma Ette, Robert Hofmiller, Matthew Green, Kathryn Nesbit, Dominick Derubbio, Patricia Jones, Tommy Smith, James Farino, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Sandra Jamerson, Stephen Hyland, John Churchill, Royston Roach, Linda Hulse, Ibrahim Doany, Jeffrey Jenkins, Dorepha Forde, Veronica John, Dawn Haskell, Robert J. Harrington, Jane M. Cristiano, Daniel Farino, June Griffin, Raymond Forde, Dora Murillo, Melrose Morris Green, Gary Mckinzy, Tatiana S. Gomez, Dina Doany-Azzam, Richard Friedman-Fox, Annete Herman, David Desperito, Stefan Fields, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Ellen Vigeant, Laurie Pater, Kathleen A. Devlin, Caitlin Feely, Dorolyne Forde, Patrick Farino, Joanne Hrycak, Jennifer Feely Artola, Deborah Khublall, Jacob Heber, Pamela Dixon, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Demetrius Fields, Chang Kim, Jennifer Green, Camille Doany, Maria Jurgens, Stephanie Feely, Michael James, Peter Fegan, Jr, Rose Costello, Mary Geraghty, April Horton, Rafael Herman, Peter Fegan, Jane Gyulavary, Jessica Derubbio, Lisa Grouzalis, Lawrence Gray, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Joseph Francis, Herman Halmon, Frank Farino, Samuel Fields, Jr, John R. Eichler, Dorna Forde, Teri Marshall, Shirley Foreman, Leander Jones, David Gordenstein, Jeanne Keating, Rebecca Loethen, Talat Hamdani, Dennis Devlin, Brian Howley, Michael Zinkofsky, Sherard Dixon, Debra Giordano, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Tatiana R. Gomez, Andrea Stauter, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Anthony Derubbio, Audrey Ades, Catherine Fleming, Aserene Smith, Daniel Frost, Anthony Desperito, Kerry Sharkey, Allen Freeman, Catherine Curley, Zamani Davis, Beverly Harrington, Erika Lutzner, Laurie Vigeant, Karen Hamorsky, Colleen Geraghty, Sharaia Fields, Lynn E. Cannata, Carol Varland, Carla Freeman, Bonnie Freiman, Marcus Foreman, Joseph Gallagher, Herbert Freiman, Norma Geraghty, Suzanne Gallagher-Adams, Michael Geis, Joseph Fogel, Stephen Geraghty, David Fogel, Xavier White, Juanita Freeman, Janet Baronian, Carolyn Belford, Michael Freiman, David Foreman, Brittany Fogel, Felicia Cappo. Related document: #17 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,, #6 Complaint,,,,,,.(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 4/8/2019 (ras).
June 26, 2018 Filing 17 Amended as per Judge Netburn's Order dated 04/04/2019 (ECF No. 60.) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #6 Complaint,,,,,, against Islamic Republic of Iran with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Ellen Vigeant, Troy Francis, Laurie Pater, Kevin Haskell, David Cannella, Kathleen A. Devlin, Dorolyne Forde, Gary Jones, Joanne Hrycak, Lori Feely, Deborah Khublall, Mary Farino, Ingrid Jaffe, Myrna Thomas, Linda Houston, Jacob Heber, Myrta Gschaar, Pamela Dixon, Angela Fields, Chang Kim, Joe Green, Peter Francis, Jennifer Green, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, George Cueller, Maria Jurgens, Michael James, Teresa Granados, Raymond Durant, Rose Costello, Rachel James, April Horton, Mary Geraghty, Itauma Ette, Rafael Herman, Peter Fegan, Robert Hofmiller, Matthew Green, Jane Gyulavary, Kathryn Nesbit, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Lisa Grouzalis, Lawrence Gray, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Patricia Jones, Joseph Francis, Herman Halmon, Tommy Smith, Teri Marshall, Dorna Forde, Leander Jones, Shirley Foreman, Rebecca Loethen, Jeanne Keating, David Gordenstein, Talat Hamdani, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Sandra Jamerson, Stephen Hyland, John Churchill, Royston Roach, Linda Hulse, Jeffrey Jenkins, Dorepha Forde, Veronica John, Brian Howley, Robert J. Harrington, Dawn Haskell, Michael Zinkofsky, Sherard Dixon, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Debra Giordano, June Griffin, Tatiana R. Gomez, Andrea Stauter, Raymond Forde, Dora Murillo, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Audrey Ades, Anthony Derubbio, Aserene Smith, Catherine Fleming, Melrose Morris Green, Gary Mckinzy, Tatiana S. Gomez, Dina Doany-Azzam, Daniel Frost, Anthony Desperito, Allen Freeman, Zamani Davis, Richard Friedman-Fox, Beverly Harrington, Erika Lutzner, Annete Herman, David Desperito, Kerry Sharkey, Frank Farino, Samia Doany, Stefan Fields, Samuel Fields, Jr, Kathleen E. Devlin, Sharif Fields, Casey Devlin, Anne Marie Hartney, Patrick Farino, Jane M. Cristiano, James Farino, Peter Fegan, Jr, Daniel Farino, Ibrahim Doany, Jennifer Feely Artola, Caitlin Feely, Demetrius Fields, Lauren Feely Ludvigson, Patricia Feely, Catherine Curley, Stephanie Feely, Camille Doany, Dennis Devlin, John R. Eichler. Related document: #6 Complaint,,,,,,.(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 4/8/2019 (ras).
June 26, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance on 06/22/2018. Document filed by Audrey Ades, David Cannella, John Churchill, Rose Costello, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Kathleen A. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, Itauma Ette, Mary Farino, Lori Feely, Peter Fegan, Angela Fields, Catherine Fleming, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Mary Geraghty, Debra Giordano, Tatiana R. Gomez, Tatiana S. Gomez, David Gordenstein, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, June Griffin, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Jane Gyulavary, Herman Halmon, Talat Hamdani, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Linda Houston, Brian Howley, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Stephen Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, Maria Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Rebecca Loethen, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Ellen Vigeant, Michael Zinkofsky. (Goldman, Jerry)
June 26, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance on 06/22/2018. Document filed by Audrey Ades, David Cannella, John Churchill, Rose Costello, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Kathleen A. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, Itauma Ette, Mary Farino, Lori Feely, Peter Fegan, Angela Fields, Catherine Fleming, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Mary Geraghty, Debra Giordano, Tatiana R. Gomez, Tatiana S. Gomez, David Gordenstein, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, June Griffin, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Jane Gyulavary, Herman Halmon, Talat Hamdani, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Linda Houston, Brian Howley, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Stephen Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, Maria Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Rebecca Loethen, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Ellen Vigeant, Michael Zinkofsky. (Goldman, Jerry)
June 26, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance on 06/22/2018. Document filed by Audrey Ades, David Cannella, John Churchill, Rose Costello, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Kathleen A. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, Itauma Ette, Mary Farino, Lori Feely, Peter Fegan, Angela Fields, Catherine Fleming, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Mary Geraghty, Debra Giordano, Tatiana R. Gomez, Tatiana S. Gomez, David Gordenstein, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, June Griffin, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Jane Gyulavary, Herman Halmon, Talat Hamdani, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Linda Houston, Brian Howley, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Stephen Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, Maria Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Rebecca Loethen, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Ellen Vigeant, Michael Zinkofsky. (Goldman, Jerry)
June 22, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Robert Maxwell on behalf of Audrey Ades, David Cannella, John Churchill, Rose Costello, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Kathleen A. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, Itauma Ette, Mary Farino, Lori Feely, Peter Fegan, Angela Fields, Catherine Fleming, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Mary Geraghty, Debra Giordano, Tatiana R. Gomez, Tatiana S. Gomez, David Gordenstein, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, June Griffin, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Jane Gyulavary, Herman Halmon, Talat Hamdani, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Linda Houston, Brian Howley, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Stephen Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, Maria Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Rebecca Loethen, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Ellen Vigeant, Michael Zinkofsky. (Maxwell, Nicholas)
June 22, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kanishka Agarwala on behalf of Audrey Ades, David Cannella, John Churchill, Rose Costello, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Kathleen A. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, Itauma Ette, Mary Farino, Lori Feely, Peter Fegan, Angela Fields, Catherine Fleming, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Mary Geraghty, Debra Giordano, Tatiana R. Gomez, Tatiana S. Gomez, David Gordenstein, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, June Griffin, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Jane Gyulavary, Herman Halmon, Talat Hamdani, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Linda Houston, Brian Howley, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Stephen Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, Maria Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Rebecca Loethen, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Ellen Vigeant, Michael Zinkofsky. (Agarwala, Kanishka)
June 22, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Bryce Litt on behalf of Audrey Ades, David Cannella, John Churchill, Rose Costello, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Kathleen A. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, Itauma Ette, Mary Farino, Lori Feely, Peter Fegan, Angela Fields, Catherine Fleming, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Mary Geraghty, Debra Giordano, Tatiana R. Gomez, Tatiana S. Gomez, David Gordenstein, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, June Griffin, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Jane Gyulavary, Herman Halmon, Talat Hamdani, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Linda Houston, Brian Howley, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Stephen Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, Maria Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Rebecca Loethen, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Ellen Vigeant, Michael Zinkofsky. (Litt, Alexander)
June 19, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Islamic Republic of Iran. (dnh)
June 15, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Islamic Republic of Iran, re: #6 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Audrey Ades, David Cannella, John Churchill, Rose Costello, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Kathleen A. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, Itauma Ette, Mary Farino, Lori Feely, Peter Fegan, Angela Fields, Catherine Fleming, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Mary Geraghty, Debra Giordano, Tatiana R. Gomez, Tatiana S. Gomez, David Gordenstein, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, June Griffin, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Jane Gyulavary, Herman Halmon, Talat Hamdani, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Linda Houston, Brian Howley, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Stephen Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, Maria Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Rebecca Loethen, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Ellen Vigeant, Michael Zinkofsky. (Goldman, Jerry)
June 15, 2018 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03MDL1570. Document filed by Audrey Ades, David Cannella, John Churchill, Rose Costello, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Kathleen A. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, Itauma Ette, Mary Farino, Lori Feely, Peter Fegan, Angela Fields, Catherine Fleming, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Mary Geraghty, Debra Giordano, Tatiana R. Gomez, Tatiana S. Gomez, David Gordenstein, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, June Griffin, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Jane Gyulavary, Herman Halmon, Talat Hamdani, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Linda Houston, Brian Howley, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Stephen Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, Maria Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Chang Kim, Rebecca Loethen, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Ellen Vigeant, Michael Zinkofsky.(Goldman, Jerry)
June 15, 2018 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldman, Jerry)
June 15, 2018 Filing 6 Amended as per Judge Netburn's Order dated 04/04/2019 (ECF No. 60.) COMPLAINT against Islamic Republic of Iran. Document filed by Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Ellen Vigeant, Troy Francis, Laurie Pater, Kevin Haskell, David Cannella, Kathleen A. Devlin, Dorolyne Forde, Gary Jones, Joanne Hrycak, Lori Feely, Deborah Khublall, Mary Farino, Ingrid Jaffe, Myrna Thomas, Linda Houston, Jacob Heber, Myrta Gschaar, Pamela Dixon, Angela Fields, Chang Kim, Joe Green, Peter Francis, Jennifer Green, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, George Cueller, Maria Jurgens, Michael James, Teresa Granados, Raymond Durant, Rose Costello, Rachel James, April Horton, Mary Geraghty, Itauma Ette, Rafael Herman, Peter Fegan, Robert Hofmiller, Matthew Green, Jane Gyulavary, Kathryn Nesbit, Dominick Derubbio, Jessica Derubbio, Lisa Grouzalis, Lawrence Gray, Robert B. Jr. Hemenway, Patricia Jones, Joseph Francis, Herman Halmon, Tommy Smith, Teri Marshall, Dorna Forde, Leander Jones, Shirley Foreman, Rebecca Loethen, Jeanne Keating, David Gordenstein, Talat Hamdani, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Sandra Jamerson, Stephen Hyland, John Churchill, Royston Roach, Linda Hulse, Jeffrey Jenkins, Dorepha Forde, Veronica John, Brian Howley, Robert J. Harrington, Dawn Haskell, Michael Zinkofsky, Sherard Dixon, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Debra Giordano, June Griffin, Tatiana R. Gomez, Andrea Stauter, Raymond Forde, Dora Murillo, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Audrey Ades, Anthony Derubbio, Aserene Smith, Catherine Fleming, Melrose Morris Green, Gary Mckinzy, Tatiana S. Gomez, Dina Doany-Azzam, Daniel Frost, Anthony Desperito, Allen Freeman, Zamani Davis, Richard Friedman-Fox, Beverly Harrington, Erika Lutzner, Annete Herman, David Desperito.(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 4/8/2019 (ras).
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Per chambers instructions) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo) Modified on 8/28/2018 (sjo). (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/29/2018) (sjo).
June 14, 2018 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
June 14, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
June 14, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
June 14, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
June 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons; all of the parties whom summom is for are not listed on docket entry; case caption does not exactly match party name as listed on initial pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
June 13, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (jgo)
June 13, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 13, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
June 13, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the related case statement;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
June 13, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, case caption does not exactly match party name as entered on CM/ECF;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
June 13, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filers were selected for the pleading; all of the filers were not selected for the pleading; due to party modification, the wrong party whom the pleading is against was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) Modified on 6/13/2018 (jgo).
June 13, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Chang Kim; Robert B. Jr. Hemenway; Islamic Republic of Iran. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
June 12, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03MDL1570. Document filed by Audrey Ades, David Cannella, Kim Chang, John Churchill, Rose Costello, George Cueller, Charlene Cumberbatch, Elaine Cunnea, Zamani Davis, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Kathleen A. Devlin, Pamela Dixon, Sherard Dixon, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, Itauma Ette, Mary Farino, Lori Feely, Peter Fegan, Angela Fields, Catherine Fleming, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Mary Geraghty, Debra Giordano, Tatiana R. Gomez, Tatiana S. Gomez, David Gordenstein, Teresa Granados, Lawrence Gray, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Matthew Green, Melrose Morris Green, June Griffin, Lisa Grouzalis, Myrta Gschaar, Jane Gyulavary, Herman Halmon, Talat Hamdani, Beverly Harrington, Robert J. Harrington, Dawn Haskell, Kevin Haskell, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Jacob Heber, Robert B. Hemenway Jr., Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, Robert Hofmiller, April Horton, Linda Houston, Brian Howley, Joanne Hrycak, Linda Hulse, Stephen Hyland, Ingrid Jaffe, Sandra Jamerson, Michael James, Rachel James, Jeffrey Jenkins, Veronica John, Gary Jones, Leander Jones, Patricia Jones, Maria Jurgens, Jeanne Keating, Deborah Khublall, Rebecca Loethen, Erika Lutzner, Teri Marshall, Gary Mckinzy, Dora Murillo, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Royston Roach, Aserene Smith, Tommy Smith, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Ellen Vigeant, Michael Zinkofsky, jessica derubbio.(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 6/13/2018 (jgo).
June 12, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Dawn Haskell, Teresa Granados, Pamela Dixon, Tommy Smith, Royston Roach, Kevin Haskell, Lawrence Gray, Leander Jones, Sherard Dixon, Robert J. Harrington, Dora Murillo, Teri Marshall, Michael Zinkofsky, Beverly Harrington, David Gordenstein, Robert B. Hemenway Jr., Rachel James, Veronica John, Maria Jurgens, Herman Halmon, Aserene Smith, Joe Green, Brian Howley, Jennifer Green, June Griffin, Jeanne Keating, Charlene Cumberbatch, Melrose Morris Green, Deborah Khublall, Zamani Davis, Lisa Grouzalis, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Linda Hulse, Michael James, Gary Mckinzy, Jeffrey Jenkins, Joanne Hrycak, Jacob Heber, Stephen Hyland, Patricia Jones, Jane Gyulavary, Linda Houston, Talat Hamdani, Myrta Gschaar, Erika Lutzner, Matthew Green, Gary Jones, Sandra Jamerson, Robert Hofmiller, David Cannella added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,.Document filed by Dawn Haskell, Teresa Granados, Pamela Dixon, Tommy Smith, Royston Roach, Kevin Haskell, Lawrence Gray, Leander Jones, Sherard Dixon, Robert J. Harrington, Dora Murillo, Teri Marshall, Michael Zinkofsky, Beverly Harrington, David Gordenstein, Robert B. Hemenway Jr., Rachel James, Veronica John, Maria Jurgens, Herman Halmon, Aserene Smith, Joe Green, Brian Howley, Jennifer Green, June Griffin, Jeanne Keating, Charlene Cumberbatch, Melrose Morris Green, Deborah Khublall, Zamani Davis, Lisa Grouzalis, Jatair Persol-Hodges, Dawn Haskell-Carbone, Linda Hulse, Michael James, Gary Mckinzy, Jeffrey Jenkins, Joanne Hrycak, Jacob Heber, Stephen Hyland, Patricia Jones, Jane Gyulavary, Linda Houston, Talat Hamdani, Myrta Gschaar, Erika Lutzner, Matthew Green, Gary Jones, Sandra Jamerson, Robert Hofmiller, David Cannella. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,.(Goldman, Jerry)
June 12, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 6/13/2018 (jgo).
June 12, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Islamic Republic of Iran, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Audrey Ades, Kim Chang, John Churchill, Rose Costello, George Cueller, Elaine Cunnea, Anthony Derubbio, Dominick Derubbio, Anthony Desperito, David Desperito, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Kathleen A. Devlin, Dina Doany-Azzam, Raymond Durant, Itauma Ette, Mary Farino, Lori Feely, Peter Fegan, Angela Fields, Catherine Fleming, Dorepha Forde, Dorna Forde, Dorolyne Forde, Raymond Forde, Shirley Foreman, Joseph Francis, Troy Francis, Peter Francis, Allen Freeman, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, Richard Friedman-Fox, Daniel Frost, Mary Geraghty, Debra Giordano, Tatiana R. Gomez, Tatiana S. Gomez, Annete Herman, Rafael Herman, April Horton, Ingrid Jaffe, Rebecca Loethen, Kathryn Nesbit, Laurie Pater, Andrea Stauter, Myrna Thomas, Ellen Vigeant, jessica derubbio. (Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 6/14/2018 (jgo).
June 12, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against The Islamic Republic of Iran. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15191830)Document filed by Ellen Vigeant, Troy Francis, Laurie Pater, Kathleen A. Devlin, Dorolyne Forde, Kathryn Nesbit, Dominick Derubbio, jessica derubbio, Lori Feely, Joseph Francis, Mary Farino, Ingrid Jaffe, Myrna Thomas, Dorna Forde, Shirley Foreman, Rebecca Loethen, Angela Fields, John Churchill, Dorepha Forde, Kim Chang, Peter Francis, Pamela Freiman-Rentzer, George Cueller, Debra Giordano, Elaine Cunnea, Tatiana R. Gomez, Andrea Stauter, Raymond Forde, Raymond Durant, Laura Desperito-Filberto, Rose Costello, Anthony Derubbio, Audrey Ades, Catherine Fleming, April Horton, Mary Geraghty, Tatiana S. Gomez, Itauma Ette, Dina Doany-Azzam, Daniel Frost, Anthony Desperito, Allen Freeman, Rafael Herman, Richard Friedman-Fox, Annete Herman, Peter Fegan, David Desperito.(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 6/13/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derubbio et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: jessica derubbio
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Vianny Maria Pichardo
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Jeffrey E Glen
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Represented By: Stephen Wah
Represented By: Samantha Emily Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zamani Davis
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Chang
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cannella
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Gray
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Francis
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Churchill
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Durant
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Giordano
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Fields
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrta Gschaar
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Zinkofsky
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Heber
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Smith
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Fegan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Jenkins
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorepha Forde
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Keating
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Griffin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Desperito
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Feely
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Freiman-Rentzer
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen A. Devlin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Harrington
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Halmon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Green
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Cunnea
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica John
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Murillo
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Green
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Jaffe
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melrose Morris Green
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Green
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Loethen
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leander Jones
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Fleming
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Horton
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrna Thomas
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Harrington
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aserene Smith
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Haskell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Desperito-Filberto
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Dixon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Jones
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Hyland
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Frost
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Doany-Azzam
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Desperito
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Stauter
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Pater
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Howley
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Vigeant
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Cumberbatch
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Jones
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Haskell-Carbone
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Derubbio
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Khublall
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hofmiller
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Nesbit
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gordenstein
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Hrycak
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Grouzalis
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royston Roach
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert B. Hemenway Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Ades
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Vianny Maria Pichardo
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Represented By: Stephen Wah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Geraghty
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Freeman
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jatair Persol-Hodges
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Derubbio
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Houston
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talat Hamdani
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Francis
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annete Herman
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Forde
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Farino
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Herman
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherard Dixon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Costello
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Lutzner
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Jamerson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Gyulavary
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Jurgens
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Mckinzy
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorolyne Forde
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Friedman-Fox
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri Marshall
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Itauma Ette
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Foreman
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatiana R. Gomez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Haskell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Cueller
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorna Forde
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel James
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatiana S. Gomez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Francis
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Granados
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Hulse
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Feely Ludvigson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Freiman
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen N. Hyland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Buividas
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hyun-Soo Freiman Fox
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Farino
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Fegan, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon R. Grabowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna Griffin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Bernstein Donati
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Vigeant
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadie Ette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Patricia Hardy
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Singleton
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Hyland
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn E. Cannata
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Curley
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Houston
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Farino
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Cappo
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Devlin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standish Halmon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ibrahim Doany
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett O. Freiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Fields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxima Jean-Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie M. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Geraghty
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Hafiz
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Gallagher-Adams
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane M. Cristiano
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Hrycak
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Geis
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Freeman
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Geraghty-Perez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Griffin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Edokpayi
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Freeman
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamar D. Hulse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefan Fields
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Sharkey
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Marie Hartney
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Geraghty
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delroy Llewellyn
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Dudek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burt A. Lewis
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Houston
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa F. Gordenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Belford
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Granados
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Houston
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Doany
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Feely
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Farino
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Geraghty
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Houston
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen M. Fogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Hyland
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Granados
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Fields
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hyland
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Griffin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen E. Devlin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gale DiFrancisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Geraghty
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Farino
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bebe Hafiz
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamitha Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Jurgens
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Baronian
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert B. Jr. Hemenway
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Represented By: Alexander Bryce Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Halmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Eichler
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Arthur R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Farino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance |