State Of New York et al v. Mnuchin et al Featured Case

The states of New York, Connecticut, Maryland, and New Jersey filed a lawsuit against Treasury Secretary Steven Mnuchin, IRS Commissioner David Kautter, and others, over the new $10,000 cap on the federal tax deduction for state and local taxes (“SALT”). The lawsuit seeks declaratory and injunctive relief.

Plaintiff: State of Maryland, State Of Connecticut, State Of New York and State of New Jersey
Defendant: United States Internal Revenue Service, David J Kautter, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States Of America and United States Department of Treasury
Case Number: 1:2018cv06427
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331vc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 58 Letter filed by State of New Jersey, State of Maryland, State Of New York, State Of Connecticut. ENDORSEMENT: The request for oral argument is granted. Oral argument on the pending motion to dismiss and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be held on June 18, 2019, at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 706 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. SO ORDERED., ( Oral Argument set for 6/18/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 706, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 5/03/2019) (ama)
March 22, 2019 Filing 58 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Caroline A. Olsen dated March 22, 2019 re: Oral Argument. Document filed by State Of Connecticut, State Of New York, State of Maryland, State of New Jersey.(Olsen, Caroline)
March 22, 2019 Filing 57 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 44 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by State Of Connecticut, State Of New York, State of Maryland, State of New Jersey. (Olsen, Caroline)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 55 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS' REPLY BRIEF SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE MARCH 22, 2019. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
March 5, 2019 Filing 55 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for the Plaintiff States' Reply Brief addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from State of New York dated March 5, 2019. Document filed by State Of New York.(Olsen, Caroline)
February 28, 2019 Filing 54 COUNTER STATEMENT TO 46 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by David J Kautter, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States Department of Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States Of America. (Barnea, Jean-David)
February 28, 2019 Filing 53 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 42 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ., 44 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . and Opposition to Cross-Motion for SJ. Document filed by David J Kautter, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States Department of Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States Of America. (Barnea, Jean-David)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 51 Letter filed by United States Department of Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States Of America, Steven T. Mnuchin, David J Kautter. ENDORSEMENT: Confirmed and approved. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 2/28/2019, Replies due by 3/15/2019.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 2/04/2019) (ama)
February 1, 2019 Filing 51 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rebecca S. Tinio dated February 1, 2019 re: Tolled Briefing Deadlines. Document filed by David J Kautter, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States Department of Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States Of America.(Tinio, Rebecca)
December 27, 2018 Case Stayed. (anc)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STANDING ORDER M10-468 The United States Attorney's Office shall notify the Court immediately upon the restoration of Department of Justice funding. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/27/2018) (ks)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. GRANTED IN PART. THE "NEED TO COORDINATE THE GOVERNMENT'S FILING WITH OTHER AGENCIES AND PERSONNEL, MANY OF WHOM WILL... BE UNAVAILABLE OVER THE HOLIDAYS" WAS READILY FORESEEABLE WHEN THE GOVERNMENT NEGOTIATED THE COURT-APPROVED BRIEFING SCHEDULE MONTHS AGO. HOWEVER, THE COURT WILL GRANT AN EXTENSION OF ONE WEEK. THE GOVERNMENT SHALL FILE ITS REPLY AND OPPOSITION ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 24, 2019. THE STATES' REPLY SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 8, 2019. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
December 20, 2018 Filing 48 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Opposition to the States' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from AUSA Jean-David Barnea dated 12/20/18. Document filed by David J Kautter, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States Department of Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States Of America.(Barnea, Jean-David)
December 14, 2018 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Owen T. Conroy in Support re: 44 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by State Of Connecticut, State Of New York, State of Maryland, State of New Jersey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53, # 54 Exhibit 54, # 55 Exhibit 55, # 56 Exhibit 56, # 57 Exhibit 57, # 58 Exhibit 58, # 59 Exhibit 59, # 60 Exhibit 60, # 61 Exhibit 61, # 62 Exhibit 62, # 63 Exhibit 63, # 64 Exhibit 64, # 65 Exhibit 65, # 66 Exhibit 66, # 67 Exhibit 67, # 68 Exhibit 68, # 69 Exhibit 69, # 70 Exhibit 70, # 71 Exhibit 71, # 72 Exhibit 72, # 73 Exhibit 73, # 74 Exhibit 74, # 75 Exhibit 75, # 76 Exhibit 76, # 77 Exhibit 77, # 78 Exhibit 78, # 79 Exhibit 79, # 80 Exhibit 80, # 81 Exhibit 81, # 82 Exhibit 82, # 83 Exhibit 83, # 84 Exhibit 84, # 85 Exhibit 85, # 86 Exhibit 86, # 87 Exhibit 87, # 88 Exhibit 88, # 89 Exhibit 89, # 90 Exhibit 90, # 91 Exhibit 91, # 92 Exhibit 92, # 93 Exhibit 93, # 94 Exhibit 94, # 95 Exhibit 95, # 96 Exhibit 96, # 97 Exhibit 97, # 98 Exhibit 98, # 99 Exhibit 99, # 100 Exhibit 100, # 101 Exhibit 101, # 102 Exhibit 102, # 103 Exhibit 103, # 104 Exhibit 104, # 105 Exhibit 105, # 106 Exhibit 106)(Conroy, Owen)
December 14, 2018 Filing 46 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by State Of Connecticut, State Of New York, State of Maryland, State of New Jersey. (Conroy, Owen)
December 14, 2018 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 44 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by State Of Connecticut, State Of New York, State of Maryland, State of New Jersey. (Conroy, Owen)
December 14, 2018 Filing 44 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by State Of Connecticut, State Of New York, State of Maryland, State of New Jersey.(Conroy, Owen)
November 2, 2018 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 42 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by David J Kautter, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States Department of Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States Of America. (Barnea, Jean-David)
November 2, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss ., MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by David J Kautter, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States Department of Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States Of America.(Barnea, Jean-David)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. GRANTED. EACH SIDE SHALL BE PERMITTED TO FILE 60 PAGES OF BRIEFING IN TOTAL. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
October 30, 2018 Filing 40 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rebecca S. Tinio dated October 30, 2018. Document filed by David J Kautter, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States Department of Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service.(Tinio, Rebecca)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GRANTED. THE PARTIES' PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS APPROVED. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
September 6, 2018 Filing 38 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint, and Proposing Briefing Schedule for Dispositive Motions addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from AUSA Jean-David Barnea dated 9/6/18. Document filed by David J Kautter, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States Department of Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States Of America.(Barnea, Jean-David)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: granting #32 Motion for Leave to File Document. The motion by Thomas T. Scambos, Jr., to file an amicus brief is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close to motion at Docket Number 32. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/27/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS. Document filed by Thomas T. Scambos, Jr. a/k/a Thomas Freed writing on behalf of "We the People" of the Commonwealth of Virginia.(sc)
July 20, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, served. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by State of Maryland, State Of Connecticut, State Of New York, State of New Jersey. (Conroy, Owen)
July 20, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Of America served on 7/20/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. Service was accepted by Haojun Lee, U.S. Attorney's Office Civil Clerk. Document filed by State of Maryland; State Of Connecticut; State Of New York; State of New Jersey. (Conroy, Owen)
July 20, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Internal Revenue Service served on 7/20/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. Service was accepted by Haojun Lee, U.S. Attorney's Office Civil Clerk. Document filed by State of Maryland; State Of Connecticut; State Of New York; State of New Jersey. (Conroy, Owen)
July 20, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. David J Kautter served on 7/20/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. Service was accepted by Haojun Lee, U.S. Attorney's Office Civil Clerk. Document filed by State of Maryland; State Of Connecticut; State Of New York; State of New Jersey. (Conroy, Owen)
July 20, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Department of Treasury served on 7/20/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. Service was accepted by Haojun Lee, U.S. Attorney's Office Civil Clerk. Document filed by State of Maryland; State Of Connecticut; State Of New York; State of New Jersey. (Conroy, Owen)
July 20, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Steven T. Mnuchin served on 7/20/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. Service was accepted by Haojun Lee, U.S. Attorney's Office Civil Clerk. Document filed by State of Maryland; State Of Connecticut; State Of New York; State of New Jersey. (Conroy, Owen)
July 20, 2018 Filing 26 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for Sarah Whynne Finnegan Rice to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15349134. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
July 20, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Sarah Whynne Finnegan Rice to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15349134. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rice, Sarah)
July 20, 2018 Filing 25 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 AMENDED MOTION for Jeremy M. Feigenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice for State of New Jersey. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
July 20, 2018 Filing 24 AMENDED MOTION for Jeremy M. Feigenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice for State of New Jersey. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of New Jersey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Feigenbaum, Jeremy)
July 19, 2018 Filing 24 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for Mark Frances Kohler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15343281. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #23 MOTION for Michael Kenneth Skold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15343354. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
July 19, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Michael Kenneth Skold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15343354. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State Of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion for PHV, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Skold, Michael)
July 19, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Mark Frances Kohler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15343281. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State Of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of PHV, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohler, Mark)
July 19, 2018 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dnh)
July 19, 2018 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Internal Revenue Service. (dnh)
July 19, 2018 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David J Kautter. (dnh)
July 19, 2018 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Treasury. (dnh)
July 19, 2018 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steven T. Mnuchin. (dnh)
July 18, 2018 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by State Of Connecticut, State Of New York, State of Maryland, State of New Jersey. (Olsen, Caroline)
July 18, 2018 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Internal Revenue Service, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by State Of Connecticut, State Of New York, State of Maryland, State of New Jersey. (Olsen, Caroline)
July 18, 2018 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David J. Kautter, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by State Of Connecticut, State Of New York, State of Maryland, State of New Jersey. (Olsen, Caroline)
July 18, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Treasury, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by State Of Connecticut, State Of New York, State of Maryland, State of New Jersey. (Olsen, Caroline)
July 18, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven T. Mnuchin, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by State Of Connecticut, State Of New York, State of Maryland, State of New Jersey. (Olsen, Caroline)
July 18, 2018 Filing 12 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Caroline Anais Olsen to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers were not selected for the request for issuance of summons; second party name on pdf 'To' section must include 'care of c/o';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 18, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #11 MOTION for Jeremy M. Feigenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice for State of New Jersey. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15338007. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Attorney Affidavit or Declaration - see Local Rule 1.3. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit or Declaration - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
July 18, 2018 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jeremy M. Feigenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice for State of New Jersey. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15338007. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of New Jersey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Feigenbaum, Jeremy) Modified on 7/18/2018 (jc).
July 18, 2018 Filing 11 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 18, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 18, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 17, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Robert Wagner on behalf of State Of New York. (Wagner, Justin)
July 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Owen Thomas Conroy on behalf of State Of New York. (Conroy, Owen)
July 17, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by State Of New York. (Olsen, Caroline) Modified on 7/18/2018 (jgo).
July 17, 2018 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Internal Revenue Service, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by State Of New York. (Olsen, Caroline) Modified on 7/18/2018 (jgo).
July 17, 2018 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David J. Kautter, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by State Of New York. (Olsen, Caroline) Modified on 7/18/2018 (jgo).
July 17, 2018 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Treasury, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by State Of New York. (Olsen, Caroline) Modified on 7/18/2018 (jgo).
July 17, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven T. Mnuchin, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by State Of New York. (Olsen, Caroline) Modified on 7/18/2018 (jgo).
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Olsen, Caroline)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Olsen, Caroline) Modified on 7/17/2018 (jgo).
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David J Kautter, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States Department of Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States Of America. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15330056)Document filed by State of Maryland, State Of Connecticut, State Of New York, State of New Jersey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Olsen, Caroline)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David J Kautter, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States Department of Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States Of America. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15330056)Document filed by State of Maryland, State Of Connecticut, State Of New York, State of New Jersey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Olsen, Caroline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Of New York et al v. Mnuchin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Jean-David Barnea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J Kautter
Represented By: Jean-David Barnea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Mnuchin
Represented By: Jean-David Barnea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Jean-David Barnea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Treasury
Represented By: Jean-David Barnea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Represented By: Sarah Whynne Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Of Connecticut
Represented By: Mark Francis Kohler
Represented By: Michael K. Skold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Of New York
Represented By: Caroline Anais Olsen
Represented By: Justin Robert Wagner
Represented By: Owen Thomas Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Jeremy M. Feigenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?