Williams v. Hale
Plaintiff: D. Williams
Defendant: Mike Hale, Dan Smith, Omar, U.S. Ranger Roper, Paul W. Greene, Ann Marie Adams, David Barber, U.S. Attorney Adam Levy, Clyde Jones, Elisabeth Shoemaker, Greg Sanders, Tracy Todd, Jeff Sessions, Shera Grant, Virginia E. Hopkins, Tommy Nail, Brandon Falls, Glennon Threatt, Jr., U.S. Attorney Joyce Vance and Misty Reynolds
Case Number: 1:2018cv08113
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 cv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of Alabama acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:18-cv-01749, filed on 10/23/2018. (sjo)
October 16, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of Alabama, Southern Division. (mro)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama, Southern Division. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/16/2018) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
October 16, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (mro)
October 16, 2018 Mailed a copy of #13 Order, to D. Williams 1830 McGraw Ave Bronx, NY 10472. (vba)
October 15, 2018 ***DELETED ENTRY. Deleted docket entry: Case Designated Local Rule 33.2. The docket entry was incorrectly filed in this case. (tro)
October 9, 2018 Filing 12 LETTER from Derrick Williams, dated 10/9/18 re: MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT. Document filed by D. Williams.(sc)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 Motion to Addendum. Document filed by D. Williams. (kv)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 LETTER from Derrick Williams dated 9/19/2018 re: Plaintiff submits 'Motion to Supplement' and requests the Court supplement(add) this motion to the court records. Document filed by D. Williams.(kv)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION TO APPLY OF RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. Document filed by D. Williams. (sc)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT(ADD). Document filed by D. Williams. (sc)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER from Derrick Williams, dated 9/13/18 re: Petitioner requests that the Court grant his request to supplement this action by adding additional facts to the respondent's violations of the petitioner's Civil Action Independent Claim under Civil Rule 60(b). Document filed by D. Williams.(sc)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT (ADD). Document filed by D. Williams. (sc)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER from Derrick Williams, dated 9/10/18 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that he supplements his petition by adding documents, and amending this petition by adding two individuals' names and two agencies. Document filed by D. Williams.(sc)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER from D. Williams re: What each individual did or violated. Document filed by D. Williams.(mro)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by D. Williams.(mro)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Mike Hale, Clyde Jones, Glennon Threatt Jr., Jeff Session, Brandon Falls, Misty Reynolds, U.S. Attorney Adam Levy, U.S. Ranger Roper, Elisabeth Shoemaker, Omar, Greg Sanders, Ann Marie Adams, David Barber, Tommy Nail, U.S. Attorney Joyce Vance, Tracy Todd, Dan Smith, Paul W. Greene, Virginia E. Hopkins, Shera Grant. Document filed by D. Williams.(mro) Modified on 10/15/2018 (sac).
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by D. Williams.(mro)
September 5, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (mro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Ranger Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul W. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Marie Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney Adam Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisabeth Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shera Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia E. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Nail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Falls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glennon Threatt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney Joyce Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?