Doe v. The New York and Presbyterian Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Christopher Walker, Audrea Blachard, Lucrencia Orphee, Jamela Daniels, Roberto Hunte Jr., Thomas Gugliemo, Michael Dzcez, Miriam Nolasco, Farley Obusan, Chastity Cruz, Chiedozie Anyanwu, Lester Welch, Juan Carlos Garcia, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital, Jensi Mercedes, May Flores and Tarik Collins
Case Number: 1:2018cv09711
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 49 LETTER from C. Walker dated 12/4/18 re: (RESPONSE)- Defendant informs the Court that the person whom the Court is looking for is not him etc. Document filed by Christopher Walker.(sc)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #45 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Audrea Blachard answer due 1/10/2019; Tarik Collins answer due 1/10/2019; Chastity Cruz answer due 1/10/2019; Michael Dzcez answer due 1/10/2019; May Flores answer due 1/10/2019; Thomas Gugliemo answer due 1/10/2019; Roberto Hunte Jr. answer due 1/10/2019; Miriam Nolasco answer due 1/10/2019; Farley Obusan answer due 1/10/2019; Lucrencia Orphee answer due 1/10/2019; The New York and Presbyterian Hospital answer due 1/10/2019; Lester Welch answer due 1/10/2019. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/27/2018) (gr)
November 27, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 7/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/27/2018) (gr)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #42 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Juan Carlos Garcia's answer due 1/4/2019. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/27/2018) (gr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 45 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Lauri F. Rasnick dated November 26, 2018. Document filed by Audrea Blachard, Tarik Collins, Chastity Cruz, Michael Dzcez, May Flores, Thomas Gugliemo, Roberto Hunte Jr., Miriam Nolasco, Farley Obusan, Lucrencia Orphee, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital, Lester Welch.(Rasnick, Lauri)
November 26, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauri Faith Rasnick on behalf of Audrea Blachard, Tarik Collins, Chastity Cruz, Michael Dzcez, May Flores, Thomas Gugliemo, Roberto Hunte Jr., Miriam Nolasco, Farley Obusan, Lucrencia Orphee, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital, Lester Welch. (Rasnick, Lauri)
November 26, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arin Mossovitz Liebman on behalf of Juan Carlos Garcia. (Liebman, Arin)
November 26, 2018 Filing 42 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Susan Friedfel dated November 26, 2018. Document filed by Juan Carlos Garcia.(Friedfel, Susan)
November 26, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Deegan Friedfel on behalf of Juan Carlos Garcia. (Friedfel, Susan)
October 29, 2018 Filing 40 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas Gugliemo. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Filing 39 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tarik Collins. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roberto Hunte Jr.. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The New York and Presbyterian Hospital. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Miriam Nolasco. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Dzcez. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to May Flores. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lucrencia Orphee. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lester Welch. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Juan Carlos Garcia. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jensi Mercedes. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jamela Daniels. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Farley Obusan. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher Walker. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chiedozie Anyanwu. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chastity Cruz. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Audrea Blachard. (pne)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Confidentiality to proceed as "Jane Doe". (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/26/2018) (gr)
October 24, 2018 Filing 22 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #21 FIRST MOTION for Confidentiality to proceed as "Jane Doe". . Document filed by Jane Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 24, 2018 Filing 21 FIRST MOTION for Confidentiality to proceed as "Jane Doe". Document filed by Jane Doe.(Melamed, Abraham)
October 23, 2018 Filing 20 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 23, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 23, 2018 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 23, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 23, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Abraham Zev Wolf Melamed to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason: no nature of suit selected on the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
October 22, 2018 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MIRIAM NOLASCO, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 22, 2018 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LESTER WELCH, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 22, 2018 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MAY FLORES, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 22, 2018 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JENSI MERCEDES, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 22, 2018 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MICHAEL DZCEZ, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 22, 2018 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TARIK COLLINS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 22, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JAMELA DANIELS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 22, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AUDREA BLACHARD, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ROBERTO HUNTE JR, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FARLEY OBUSAN, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHRISTOPHER WALKER, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LUCRENCIA ORPHEE, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THOMAS GUGLIEMO, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHASTITY CRUZ, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHIEDOZIE ANYANWU, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JUAN CARLOS GARCIA, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE NEW YORK AND PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Melamed, Abraham) Modified on 10/23/2018 (pne).
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chiedozie Anyanwu, Audrea Blachard, Tarik Collins, Chastity Cruz, Jamela Daniels, Michael Dzcez, May Flores, Juan Carlos Garcia, Thomas Gugliemo, Roberto Hunte Jr., Jensi Mercedes, Miriam Nolasco, Farley Obusan, Lucrencia Orphee, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital, Christopher Walker, Lester Welch. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15790207)Document filed by Jane Doe.(Melamed, Abraham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. The New York and Presbyterian Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrea Blachard
Represented By: Lauri Faith Rasnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucrencia Orphee
Represented By: Lauri Faith Rasnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamela Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Hunte Jr.
Represented By: Lauri Faith Rasnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Gugliemo
Represented By: Lauri Faith Rasnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dzcez
Represented By: Lauri Faith Rasnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miriam Nolasco
Represented By: Lauri Faith Rasnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farley Obusan
Represented By: Lauri Faith Rasnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chastity Cruz
Represented By: Lauri Faith Rasnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiedozie Anyanwu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Welch
Represented By: Lauri Faith Rasnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Carlos Garcia
Represented By: Arin Mossovitz Liebman
Represented By: Susan Deegan Friedfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York and Presbyterian Hospital
Represented By: Lauri Faith Rasnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jensi Mercedes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: May Flores
Represented By: Lauri Faith Rasnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarik Collins
Represented By: Lauri Faith Rasnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Abraham Zev Wolf Melamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?