Musadique v. Whitaker et al

Plaintiff: Mohamed Musadique
Defendant: Mark Hansen, Kirstjen M. Nielsen and Matthew G. Whitaker
Case Number: 1:2018cv11438
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Visuvanathan Rudrakumaran to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Caption Error; The caption must directly correspond to the pleading. If the entire caption does not fit list the leading party followed by 'et al'. Defendant Name Error; the defendant name listed on the PDF must exactly match the party of record (Kristjen M. Nielsen). All of the parties have not yet been added to CM/ECF (K. Sohrakoff). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Matthew Whitaker, Kirstjen Nielsen, Mark Hansen, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Mohamed Musadique. (Rudrakumaran, Visuvanathan) Modified on 12/11/2018 (dnh).
December 10, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 10, 2018 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
December 10, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
December 10, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Visuvanathan Rudrakumaran. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens. (sj)
December 10, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Visuvanathan Rudrakumaran. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Matthew G. Whitaker; Kirstjen M. Nielsen; Mark Hansen. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
December 10, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Visuvanathan Rudrakumaran to RE-FILE re: Document No. #3 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against Mark Hansen, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Matthew G. Whitaker. Document filed by Mohamed Musadique. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - C)(Rudrakumaran, Visuvanathan) Modified on 12/10/2018 (sj).
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rudrakumaran, Visuvanathan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Matthew G. Whitaker. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16016717)Document filed by Mohamed Musadique. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - C)(Rudrakumaran, Visuvanathan) Modified on 12/7/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Musadique v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Musadique
Represented By: Visuvanathan Rudrakumaran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?