Barbuto et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Christopher Power, John Licata, Donald Gannon, William H. Savage Jr., Jose Gonzalez, Anthony Iraci, Lance Patrouch, Frank Squicciarini, Christopher Irons, John Carillo, Elias Jimenez, Thomas Murray, James Walker, John Zucco, Thomas Biryla, Wanda Marte, Kenneth Shaffer, Raymond Reilly, Felix Perez, Michael Musso, Jenny Mami Morales, Jack Moscato, Juan Madera, Mark Tynan, Bruce David Martin, John Powers, Paul Schmalzried, Eric Samuels, Andrew Martino, Richard Ruiz, Todd M. Hoyle, Lisa Prati, Edward Nicholson, Philip Quattrocchi, William F. Ryan, Vincent Williams, Anthony J. Bencivengo, Michael Sibbio, Joseph Welsh III, Sheldon Fein, Bryan McDonough, Robert Sacchi, Andrew Porazzo, Luis Pena, William Hayden, Joseph Dawson, Paul Pfeifer, Monica Scott, Anthony Prioleau, Israel De Graffe, Brian Cregan, Michael Giammarino, Robert Zuffi, Wallace Davenport, Robert Blanco, Dominick Scali, Daniel Guire, Dennis Lane, William Kinsley, Andrew Vasko, Nadia Barbuto, Christopher Santangelo, Allen Kane, Glenn Tarquinio, Jonathan Hilton, Christopher Wanker, Michael Thompson, Calogero Caruso, Duane Marcy, Peter Mule, Christopher Skinner, Thomas McGrath, Richard Sere, Steven Bascelli, Kenneth Russo, Jarjeam Felton, Joseph Miccoli, John Kappen, James Woods, Noel Moloney, Sean McCafferty, Sean Moon, Rosario Sciove, Michael Cuttino, William Leder, Kevin Flynn, Jonathan Hill, John Gormley, Wayne Tennent, Daniel Moran, Hughburne Goring, Mark McQuillan, Reid Jantz, John Paulik, Edward Montemurro, John McManus, Daniel Gorman, Charlotte Carmichael, Joseph Dziekanowski and Donald Csorny
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11580
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 1/17/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Document filed by Reid Jantz; Christopher Irons; Glenn Tarquinio; John Paulik; Michael Giammarino; Anthony Prioleau; John Carillo; William H. Savage Jr.; Daniel Guire; James Woods; Jarjeam Felton; Philip Quattrocchi; Joseph Dziekanowski; Wanda Marte; Sean Moon; Monica Scott; Richard Ruiz; William Hayden; James Walker; Jack Moscato; Edward Nicholson; Donald Gannon; Michael Thompson; Frank Squicciarini; Brian Cregan; Anthony Iraci; Allen Kane; Donald Csorny; Wayne Tennent; Eric Samuels; Bryan McDonough; Michael Sibbio; Mark Tynan; Robert Sacchi; Felix Perez; Jonathan Hilton; John McManus; William Leder; Luis Pena; Joseph Welsh III; Peter Mule; Juan Madera; Michael Cuttino; Israel De Graffe; Dominick Scali; Joseph Miccoli; Michael Musso; Daniel Moran; Robert Zuffi; Raymond Reilly; Paul Pfeifer; Bruce David Martin; Kenneth Shaffer; William F. Ryan; Kevin Flynn; Lance Patrouch; Edward Montemurro; Andrew Porazzo; Lisa Prati; Christopher Power; Nadia Barbuto; Sheldon Fein; Christopher Skinner; Todd M. Hoyle; John Zucco; Paul Schmalzried; John Gormley; Jonathan Hill; Rosario Sciove; Kenneth Russo; John Licata; Joseph Dawson; John Powers; Thomas Murray; Thomas McGrath; Daniel Gorman; Noel Moloney; Christopher Santangelo; Jose Gonzalez; Jenny Mami Morales; Andrew Martino; Hughburne Goring; Wallace Davenport; Christopher Wanker; Robert Blanco; Richard Sere; Steven Bascelli; John Kappen; Andrew Vasko; Calogero Caruso; Mark McQuillan; Sean McCafferty; Charlotte Carmichael; Dennis Lane; Vincent Williams; Anthony J. Bencivengo; Elias Jimenez; William Kinsley; Duane Marcy; Thomas Biryla. (Kreindler, James)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-mdl-1570 (GBD)(SN). Document filed by Nadia Barbuto, Steven Bascelli, Anthony J. Bencivengo, Thomas Biryla, Robert Blanco, John Carillo, Charlotte Carmichael, Calogero Caruso, Brian Cregan, Donald Csorny, Michael Cuttino, Wallace Davenport, Joseph Dawson, Israel De Graffe, Joseph Dziekanowski, Sheldon Fein, Jarjeam Felton, Kevin Flynn, Donald Gannon, Michael Giammarino, Jose Gonzalez, Hughburne Goring, Daniel Gorman, John Gormley, Daniel Guire, William Hayden, Jonathan Hill, Jonathan Hilton, Todd M. Hoyle, Anthony Iraci, Christopher Irons, Reid Jantz, Elias Jimenez, Allen Kane, John Kappen, William Kinsley, Dennis Lane, William Leder, John Licata, Juan Madera, Jenny Mami Morales, Duane Marcy, Wanda Marte, Bruce David Martin, Andrew Martino, Sean McCafferty, Bryan McDonough, Thomas McGrath, John McManus, Mark McQuillan, Joseph Miccoli, Noel Moloney, Edward Montemurro, Sean Moon, Daniel Moran, Jack Moscato, Peter Mule, Thomas Murray, Michael Musso, Edward Nicholson, Lance Patrouch, John Paulik, Luis Pena, Felix Perez, Paul Pfeifer, Andrew Porazzo, Christopher Power, John Powers, Lisa Prati, Anthony Prioleau, Philip Quattrocchi, Raymond Reilly, Richard Ruiz, Kenneth Russo, William F. Ryan, Robert Sacchi, Eric Samuels, Christopher Santangelo, William H. Savage Jr., Dominick Scali, Paul Schmalzried, Rosario Sciove, Monica Scott, Richard Sere, Kenneth Shaffer, Michael Sibbio, Christopher Skinner, Frank Squicciarini, Glenn Tarquinio, Wayne Tennent, Michael Thompson, Mark Tynan, Andrew Vasko, James Walker, Christopher Wanker, Joseph Welsh III, Vincent Williams, James Woods, John Zucco, Robert Zuffi.(Benett, Megan)
December 12, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03md1570. (sj)
December 12, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 12, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
December 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Megan Wolfe Benett to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the related case statement is not correct; caption error. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS PDF ERROR STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03 MDL 1570 (GBD) (SN). Document filed by Nadia Barbuto, Steven Bascelli, Anthony J. Bencivengo, Thomas Biryla, Robert Blanco, John Carillo, Charlotte Carmichael, Calogero Caruso, Brian Cregan, Donald Csorny, Michael Cuttino, Wallace Davenport, Joseph Dawson, Israel De Graffe, Joseph Dziekanowski, Sheldon Fein, Jarjeam Felton, Kevin Flynn, Donald Gannon, Michael Giammarino, Jose Gonzalez, Hughburne Goring, Daniel Gorman, John Gormley, Daniel Guire, William Hayden, Jonathan Hill, Jonathan Hilton, Todd M. Hoyle, Anthony Iraci, Christopher Irons, Reid Jantz, Elias Jimenez, Allen Kane, John Kappen, William Kinsley, Dennis Lane, William Leder, John Licata, Juan Madera, Jenny Mami Morales, Duane Marcy, Wanda Marte, Bruce David Martin, Andrew Martino, Sean McCafferty, Bryan McDonough, Thomas McGrath, John McManus, Mark McQuillan, Joseph Miccoli, Noel Moloney, Edward Montemurro, Sean Moon, Daniel Moran, Jack Moscato, Peter Mule, Thomas Murray, Michael Musso, Edward Nicholson, Lance Patrouch, John Paulik, Luis Pena, Felix Perez, Paul Pfeifer, Andrew Porazzo, Christopher Power, John Powers, Lisa Prati, Anthony Prioleau, Philip Quattrocchi, Raymond Reilly, Richard Ruiz, Kenneth Russo, William F. Ryan, Robert Sacchi, Eric Samuels, Christopher Santangelo, William H. Savage Jr., Dominick Scali, Paul Schmalzried, Rosario Sciove, Monica Scott, Richard Sere, Kenneth Shaffer, Michael Sibbio, Christopher Skinner, Frank Squicciarini, Glenn Tarquinio, Wayne Tennent, Michael Thompson, Mark Tynan, Andrew Vasko, James Walker, Christopher Wanker, Joseph Welsh III, Vincent Williams, James Woods, John Zucco, Robert Zuffi.(Benett, Megan) Modified on 12/12/2018 (sj).
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Benett, Megan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16039014)Document filed by Reid Jantz, Christopher Irons, Glenn Tarquinio, John Paulik, Michael Giammarino, Anthony Prioleau, John Carillo, William H. Savage Jr., Daniel Guire, James Woods, Jarjeam Felton, Philip Quattrocchi, Joseph Dziekanowski, Wanda Marte, Sean Moon, Monica Scott, Richard Ruiz, William Hayden, James Walker, Jack Moscato, Edward Nicholson, Donald Gannon, Michael Thompson, Frank Squicciarini, Brian Cregan, Anthony Iraci, Allen Kane, Donald Csorny, Wayne Tennent, Eric Samuels, Bryan McDonough, Michael Sibbio, Mark Tynan, Robert Sacchi, Felix Perez, Jonathan Hilton, John McManus, William Leder, Luis Pena, Joseph Welsh III, Peter Mule, Juan Madera, Michael Cuttino, Israel De Graffe, Dominick Scali, Joseph Miccoli, Michael Musso, Daniel Moran, Robert Zuffi, Raymond Reilly, Paul Pfeifer, Bruce David Martin, Kenneth Shaffer, William F. Ryan, Kevin Flynn, Lance Patrouch, Edward Montemurro, Andrew Porazzo, Lisa Prati, Christopher Power, Nadia Barbuto, Sheldon Fein, Christopher Skinner, Todd M. Hoyle, John Zucco, Paul Schmalzried, John Gormley, Jonathan Hill, Rosario Sciove, Kenneth Russo, John Licata, Joseph Dawson, John Powers, Thomas Murray, Thomas McGrath, Daniel Gorman, Noel Moloney, Christopher Santangelo, Jose Gonzalez, Jenny Mami Morales, Andrew Martino, Hughburne Goring, Wallace Davenport, Christopher Wanker, Robert Blanco, Richard Sere, Steven Bascelli, John Kappen, Andrew Vasko, Calogero Caruso, Mark McQuillan, Sean McCafferty, Charlotte Carmichael, Dennis Lane, Vincent Williams, Anthony J. Bencivengo, Elias Jimenez, William Kinsley, Duane Marcy, Thomas Biryla. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Benett, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbuto et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Power
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Licata
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Gannon
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Savage Jr.
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gonzalez
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Iraci
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Patrouch
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Squicciarini
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Irons
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Carillo
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elias Jimenez
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Murray
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Walker
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Zucco
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Biryla
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Marte
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Shaffer
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Reilly
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Perez
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Musso
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Mami Morales
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Moscato
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Madera
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Tynan
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce David Martin
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Powers
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Schmalzried
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Samuels
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Martino
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ruiz
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd M. Hoyle
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Prati
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Nicholson
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Quattrocchi
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F. Ryan
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Williams
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony J. Bencivengo
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sibbio
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Welsh III
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheldon Fein
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan McDonough
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sacchi
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Porazzo
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Pena
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hayden
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Dawson
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Pfeifer
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Scott
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Prioleau
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel De Graffe
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Cregan
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Giammarino
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Zuffi
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallace Davenport
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Blanco
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Scali
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Guire
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Lane
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Kinsley
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Vasko
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadia Barbuto
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Santangelo
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Kane
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Tarquinio
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hilton
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wanker
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Thompson
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calogero Caruso
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Marcy
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Mule
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Skinner
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas McGrath
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Sere
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Bascelli
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Russo
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarjeam Felton
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Miccoli
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kappen
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Woods
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Moloney
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean McCafferty
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Moon
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosario Sciove
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cuttino
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Leder
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Flynn
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hill
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gormley
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Tennent
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Moran
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hughburne Goring
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark McQuillan
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reid Jantz
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Paulik
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Montemurro
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McManus
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Gorman
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Carmichael
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Dziekanowski
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Csorny
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?