Thatcher et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: June Truesdale, Salina Uddin, Praxedis Valenzuela, Dominick Vitucci, Jerry Williams, Beverly Thompson, Traddis Waddell, Janet H Thevenot, Ivette Yolanda Torres, Thomas White, John Vessia, Sotireos Voyages, Steve Triglianos, Electra Weeks, Yolanda Williams, Shirley Turner, Jeff Thomas, Vincent Vdokakes, Konstantinos Tsiavos, Juanita Thomas, Kenneth Walker, George Trano, Daniel Tobia, Francis M Tunney, Nancy Tolbert, Timothy Thatcher, Yakov Volovnik, Yvette Thomas, Earl White, Theodore Vassilowitch, David Warshaw, Gayle Thom, Eduardo Weinschelbaum, Carol Vatter, Troy Turner, Jose Urena, Malik Wellington, Rosa Valentin, Benita Truss, Camilla Webster, Charles Walker, Howard Wexler, Lorraine White, Angelo Tzortatos, Frederick Warren, Aniedi Usoroh, Terrence J Walsh, Joseph Vaccarella, Patrick Toussaint, Harry Weiss, Colleen Thomas, Isaiah Washington, Michael Williams, Jeffery Turner, Fitz Wallace, Valerie Williams, Henry Vasquez, Deborah Thomas, Clayton White, Joseph Tronzano, Kate Watson, William Ward, Harry Williams, Belinda Turpin-Spratley, Marilyn Thornton, Alfonso Vazquez, Lavern White, Debra Wells-Lynn, Mary E White, Kenneth Thompson, Elaine Whitaker, Joseph A Tolino, George Vieiro, David Ulmschneider, Lana Tutunik, Stacey Wanicur, Mark Vantassel, Tawanna Williams, David Vasquez, Gilbert Williams, Luke Weeks, Jeanne Thompson-McKenzie, Mohsen Vahedi, Wlodzimierz Welenc, Kym Voelker, Michael Wagner, Charles Treanor, Rosendo Velez, Dinia Wallace, Paul Trupia, Ianthe Vidal'Victor, Michael Ward, Dorothy Thomas, Natalie Tonoyan, Elaina Toti, Edwin Urena, Matthew Tuckruskye, Albert Tornatore, Robert Wallin and Brian L Valade
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11814
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/4/2019 re: Briefing Schedule on Havlish-Hoglan Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Havlish-Hoglan Letter to Judge Netburn, #2 Exhibit B - PECs Letter to Judge Netburn)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying (479) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (833) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4287) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (500) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; denying (465) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (675) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; denying (586) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; denying (641) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (595) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (405) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (527) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; denying (367) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; denying (623) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (130) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; denying (285) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; denying (1003) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; denying (48) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; denying (408) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; denying (133) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (111) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; denying (75) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (104) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (114) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (72) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (79) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (67) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (65) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (47) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (32) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; denying (44) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; denying (18) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; denying (11) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; denying (402) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; denying (485) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; denying (1040) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (398) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; denying (404) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. Application DENIED. A request to defer the Court's written decision is not the proper way to bring additional relevant information to the Court's attention. Saudi Arabia's request to file a redacted version of its December 18, 2018 letter is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Return Date set for 1/3/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Report and Recommendation, #3 Exhibit List of Judgments, #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics 2018, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (12 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Return Date set for 1/2/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Mag. J. Report and Recommendation 7/12/16, #3 Exhibit List of Iran Judgments (not exhaustive), #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
December 19, 2018 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
December 19, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
December 19, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
December 19, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (pne)
December 18, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-MD-1570. (pne)
December 18, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 18, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
December 17, 2018 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (pne)
December 17, 2018 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (pne)
December 17, 2018 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 1 COMPLAINT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (pne)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #7 Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Timothy Thatcher, Janet H Thevenot, Gayle Thom, Colleen Thomas, Deborah Thomas, Dorothy Thomas, Jeff Thomas, Juanita Thomas, Yvette Thomas, Beverly Thompson, Kenneth Thompson, Jeanne Thompson-McKenzie, Marilyn Thornton, Daniel Tobia, Nancy Tolbert, Joseph A Tolino, Natalie Tonoyan, Albert Tornatore, Ivette Yolanda Torres, Elaina Toti, Patrick Toussaint, George Trano, Charles Treanor, Steve Triglianos, Joseph Tronzano, June Truesdale, Paul Trupia, Benita Truss, Konstantinos Tsiavos, Matthew Tuckruskye, Francis M Tunney, Jeffery Turner, Shirley Turner, Troy Turner, Belinda Turpin-Spratley, Lana Tutunik, Angelo Tzortatos, Salina Uddin, David Ulmschneider, Edwin Urena, Jose Urena, Aniedi Usoroh, Joseph Vaccarella, Mohsen Vahedi, Brian L Valade, Rosa Valentin, Praxedis Valenzuela, Mark Vantassel, David Vasquez, Henry Vasquez, Theodore Vassilowitch, Carol Vatter, Alfonso Vazquez, Vincent Vdokakes, Rosendo Velez, John Vessia, Ianthe Vidal'Victor, George Vieiro, Dominick Vitucci, Kym Voelker, Yakov Volovnik, Sotireos Voyages, Traddis Waddell, Michael Wagner, Charles Walker, Kenneth Walker, Dinia Wallace, Fitz Wallace, Robert Wallin, Terrence J Walsh, Stacey Wanicur, Michael Ward, William Ward, Frederick Warren, David Warshaw, Isaiah Washington, Kate Watson, Camilla Webster, Electra Weeks, Luke Weeks, Eduardo Weinschelbaum, Harry Weiss, Wlodzimierz Welenc, Malik Wellington, Debra Wells-Lynn, Howard Wexler, Elaine Whitaker, Clayton White, Earl White, Lavern White, Lorraine White, Mary E White, Thomas White, Gilbert Williams, Harry Williams, Jerry Williams, Michael Williams, Tawanna Williams, Valerie Williams, Yolanda Williams. (Wang, Kevin)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Timothy Thatcher, Janet H Thevenot, Gayle Thom, Colleen Thomas, Deborah Thomas, Dorothy Thomas, Jeff Thomas, Juanita Thomas, Yvette Thomas, Beverly Thompson, Kenneth Thompson, Jeanne Thompson-McKenzie, Marilyn Thornton, Daniel Tobia, Nancy Tolbert, Joseph A Tolino, Natalie Tonoyan, Albert Tornatore, Ivette Yolanda Torres, Elaina Toti, Patrick Toussaint, George Trano, Charles Treanor, Steve Triglianos, Joseph Tronzano, June Truesdale, Paul Trupia, Benita Truss, Konstantinos Tsiavos, Matthew Tuckruskye, Francis M Tunney, Jeffery Turner, Shirley Turner, Troy Turner, Belinda Turpin-Spratley, Lana Tutunik, Angelo Tzortatos, Salina Uddin, David Ulmschneider, Edwin Urena, Jose Urena, Aniedi Usoroh, Joseph Vaccarella, Mohsen Vahedi, Brian L Valade, Rosa Valentin, Praxedis Valenzuela, Mark Vantassel, David Vasquez, Henry Vasquez, Theodore Vassilowitch, Carol Vatter, Alfonso Vazquez, Vincent Vdokakes, Rosendo Velez, John Vessia, Ianthe Vidal'Victor, George Vieiro, Dominick Vitucci, Kym Voelker, Yakov Volovnik, Sotireos Voyages, Traddis Waddell, Michael Wagner, Charles Walker, Kenneth Walker, Dinia Wallace, Fitz Wallace, Robert Wallin, Terrence J Walsh, Stacey Wanicur, Michael Ward, William Ward, Frederick Warren, David Warshaw, Isaiah Washington, Kate Watson, Camilla Webster, Electra Weeks, Luke Weeks, Eduardo Weinschelbaum, Harry Weiss, Wlodzimierz Welenc, Malik Wellington, Debra Wells-Lynn, Howard Wexler, Elaine Whitaker, Clayton White, Earl White, Lavern White, Lorraine White, Mary E White, Thomas White, Gilbert Williams, Harry Williams, Jerry Williams, Michael Williams, Tawanna Williams, Valerie Williams, Yolanda Williams.(Wang, Kevin)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wang, Kevin)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16068537)Document filed by Troy Turner, Shirley Turner, Clayton White, Traddis Waddell, Patrick Toussaint, Stacey Wanicur, Juanita Thomas, Electra Weeks, June Truesdale, Tawanna Williams, Albert Tornatore, William Ward, Joseph A Tolino, Mohsen Vahedi, Rosendo Velez, Malik Wellington, Frederick Warren, Paul Trupia, Gilbert Williams, Ianthe Vidal'Victor, Yakov Volovnik, Elaina Toti, Earl White, Mary E White, Beverly Thompson, Francis M Tunney, Belinda Turpin-Spratley, Kenneth Thompson, Lavern White, Camilla Webster, Mark Vantassel, Elaine Whitaker, Thomas White, Kate Watson, Kenneth Walker, Konstantinos Tsiavos, Henry Vasquez, David Ulmschneider, Michael Wagner, Harry Williams, George Vieiro, Edwin Urena, Jeanne Thompson-McKenzie, Nancy Tolbert, Eduardo Weinschelbaum, Carol Vatter, Kym Voelker, John Vessia, Michael Ward, Charles Walker, Brian L Valade, Howard Wexler, Isaiah Washington, Ivette Yolanda Torres, Sotireos Voyages, Vincent Vdokakes, Dinia Wallace, Terrence J Walsh, Fitz Wallace, Janet H Thevenot, Natalie Tonoyan, Timothy Thatcher, Lorraine White, Matthew Tuckruskye, Michael Williams, Harry Weiss, Joseph Tronzano, Benita Truss, Wlodzimierz Welenc, David Warshaw, Jose Urena, Daniel Tobia, Robert Wallin, Dominick Vitucci, David Vasquez, Steve Triglianos, Alfonso Vazquez, Luke Weeks, George Trano, Aniedi Usoroh, Rosa Valentin, Charles Treanor, Marilyn Thornton, Yolanda Williams, Dorothy Thomas, Debra Wells-Lynn, Gayle Thom, Lana Tutunik, Valerie Williams, Colleen Thomas, Theodore Vassilowitch, Praxedis Valenzuela, Yvette Thomas, Salina Uddin, Jerry Williams, Deborah Thomas, Jeffery Turner, Angelo Tzortatos, Joseph Vaccarella, Jeff Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix)(Wang, Kevin)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Kevin Wang dated 12/17/2018 re: Request for Inclusion in 03-MD-1570. Document filed by Timothy Thatcher, Janet H Thevenot, Gayle Thom, Colleen Thomas, Deborah Thomas, Dorothy Thomas, Jeff Thomas, Juanita Thomas, Yvette Thomas, Beverly Thompson, Kenneth Thompson, Jeanne Thompson-McKenzie, Marilyn Thornton, Daniel Tobia, Nancy Tolbert, Joseph A Tolino, Natalie Tonoyan, Albert Tornatore, Ivette Yolanda Torres, Elaina Toti, Patrick Toussaint, George Trano, Charles Treanor, Steve Triglianos, Joseph Tronzano, June Truesdale, Paul Trupia, Benita Truss, Konstantinos Tsiavos, Matthew Tuckruskye, Francis M Tunney, Jeffery Turner, Shirley Turner, Troy Turner, Belinda Turpin-Spratley, Lana Tutunik, Angelo Tzortatos, Salina Uddin, David Ulmschneider, Edwin Urena, Jose Urena, Aniedi Usoroh, Joseph Vaccarella, Mohsen Vahedi, Brian L Valade, Rosa Valentin, Praxedis Valenzuela, Mark Vantassel, David Vasquez, Henry Vasquez, Theodore Vassilowitch, Carol Vatter, Alfonso Vazquez, Vincent Vdokakes, Rosendo Velez, John Vessia, Ianthe Vidal'Victor, George Vieiro, Dominick Vitucci, Kym Voelker, Yakov Volovnik, Sotireos Voyages, Traddis Waddell, Michael Wagner, Charles Walker, Kenneth Walker, Dinia Wallace, Fitz Wallace, Robert Wallin, Terrence J Walsh, Stacey Wanicur, Michael Ward, William Ward, Frederick Warren, David Warshaw, Isaiah Washington, Kate Watson, Camilla Webster, Electra Weeks, Luke Weeks, Eduardo Weinschelbaum, Harry Weiss, Wlodzimierz Welenc, Malik Wellington, Debra Wells-Lynn, Howard Wexler, Elaine Whitaker, Clayton White, Earl White, Lavern White, Lorraine White, Mary E White, Thomas White, Gilbert Williams, Harry Williams, Jerry Williams, Michael Williams, Tawanna Williams, Valerie Williams, Yolanda Williams.(Wang, Kevin)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Kevin Wang dated 12/17/2018 re: Request for Inclusion in 03 MDL 01570. Document filed by Timothy Thatcher, Janet H Thevenot, Gayle Thom, Colleen Thomas, Deborah Thomas, Dorothy Thomas, Jeff Thomas, Juanita Thomas, Yvette Thomas, Beverly Thompson, Kenneth Thompson, Jeanne Thompson-McKenzie, Marilyn Thornton, Daniel Tobia, Nancy Tolbert, Joseph A Tolino, Natalie Tonoyan, Albert Tornatore, Ivette Yolanda Torres, Elaina Toti, Patrick Toussaint, George Trano, Charles Treanor, Steve Triglianos, Joseph Tronzano, June Truesdale, Paul Trupia, Benita Truss, Konstantinos Tsiavos, Matthew Tuckruskye, Francis M Tunney, Jeffery Turner, Shirley Turner, Troy Turner, Belinda Turpin-Spratley, Lana Tutunik, Angelo Tzortatos, Salina Uddin, David Ulmschneider, Edwin Urena, Jose Urena, Aniedi Usoroh, Joseph Vaccarella, Mohsen Vahedi, Brian L Valade, Rosa Valentin, Praxedis Valenzuela, Mark Vantassel, David Vasquez, Henry Vasquez, Theodore Vassilowitch, Carol Vatter, Alfonso Vazquez, Vincent Vdokakes, Rosendo Velez, John Vessia, Ianthe Vidal'Victor, George Vieiro, Dominick Vitucci, Kym Voelker, Yakov Volovnik, Sotireos Voyages, Traddis Waddell, Michael Wagner, Charles Walker, Kenneth Walker, Dinia Wallace, Fitz Wallace, Robert Wallin, Terrence J Walsh, Stacey Wanicur, Michael Ward, William Ward, Frederick Warren, David Warshaw, Isaiah Washington, Kate Watson, Camilla Webster, Electra Weeks, Luke Weeks, Eduardo Weinschelbaum, Harry Weiss, Wlodzimierz Welenc, Malik Wellington, Debra Wells-Lynn, Howard Wexler, Elaine Whitaker, Clayton White, Earl White, Lavern White, Lorraine White, Mary E White, Thomas White, Gilbert Williams, Harry Williams, Jerry Williams, Michael Williams, Tawanna Williams, Valerie Williams, Yolanda Williams.(Wang, Kevin)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Timothy Thatcher, Janet H Thevenot, Gayle Thom, Colleen Thomas, Deborah Thomas, Dorothy Thomas, Jeff Thomas, Juanita Thomas, Yvette Thomas, Beverly Thompson, Kenneth Thompson, Jeanne Thompson-McKenzie, Marilyn Thornton, Daniel Tobia, Nancy Tolbert, Joseph A Tolino, Natalie Tonoyan, Albert Tornatore, Ivette Yolanda Torres, Elaina Toti, Patrick Toussaint, George Trano, Charles Treanor, Steve Triglianos, Joseph Tronzano, June Truesdale, Paul Trupia, Benita Truss, Konstantinos Tsiavos, Matthew Tuckruskye, Francis M Tunney, Jeffery Turner, Shirley Turner, Troy Turner, Belinda Turpin-Spratley, Lana Tutunik, Angelo Tzortatos, Salina Uddin, David Ulmschneider, Edwin Urena, Jose Urena, Aniedi Usoroh, Joseph Vaccarella, Mohsen Vahedi, Brian L Valade, Rosa Valentin, Praxedis Valenzuela, Mark Vantassel, David Vasquez, Henry Vasquez, Theodore Vassilowitch, Carol Vatter, Alfonso Vazquez, Vincent Vdokakes, Rosendo Velez, John Vessia, Ianthe Vidal'Victor, George Vieiro, Dominick Vitucci, Kym Voelker, Yakov Volovnik, Sotireos Voyages, Traddis Waddell, Michael Wagner, Charles Walker, Kenneth Walker, Dinia Wallace, Fitz Wallace, Robert Wallin, Terrence J Walsh, Stacey Wanicur, Michael Ward, William Ward, Frederick Warren, David Warshaw, Isaiah Washington, Kate Watson, Camilla Webster, Electra Weeks, Luke Weeks, Eduardo Weinschelbaum, Harry Weiss, Wlodzimierz Welenc, Malik Wellington, Debra Wells-Lynn, Howard Wexler, Elaine Whitaker, Clayton White, Earl White, Lavern White, Lorraine White, Mary E White, Thomas White, Gilbert Williams, Harry Williams, Jerry Williams, Michael Williams, Tawanna Williams, Valerie Williams, Yolanda Williams. (Wang, Kevin) Modified on 12/18/2018 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thatcher et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Truesdale
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salina Uddin
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Praxedis Valenzuela
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Vitucci
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Williams
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Thompson
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traddis Waddell
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet H Thevenot
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivette Yolanda Torres
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas White
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Vessia
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sotireos Voyages
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Triglianos
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electra Weeks
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Williams
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Turner
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Thomas
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Vdokakes
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Konstantinos Tsiavos
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Thomas
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Walker
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Trano
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Tobia
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis M Tunney
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Tolbert
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Thatcher
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yakov Volovnik
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Thomas
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl White
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Vassilowitch
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Warshaw
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle Thom
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Weinschelbaum
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Vatter
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Turner
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Urena
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malik Wellington
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Valentin
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benita Truss
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camilla Webster
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Walker
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Wexler
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine White
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Tzortatos
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Warren
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aniedi Usoroh
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence J Walsh
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Vaccarella
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Toussaint
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Weiss
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Thomas
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Washington
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Williams
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Turner
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitz Wallace
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Williams
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Vasquez
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Thomas
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton White
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Tronzano
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kate Watson
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ward
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Williams
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Turpin-Spratley
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Thornton
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Vazquez
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavern White
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Wells-Lynn
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E White
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Thompson
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Whitaker
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A Tolino
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Vieiro
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ulmschneider
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana Tutunik
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Wanicur
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Vantassel
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawanna Williams
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Vasquez
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Williams
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Weeks
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Thompson-McKenzie
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohsen Vahedi
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wlodzimierz Welenc
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kym Voelker
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wagner
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Treanor
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosendo Velez
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinia Wallace
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Trupia
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ianthe Vidal'Victor
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ward
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Thomas
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Tonoyan
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaina Toti
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Urena
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Tuckruskye
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Tornatore
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wallin
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian L Valade
Represented By: Kevin Shi Yi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?