Sansevero et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Patricia Santanastaso, Terry Simmons, Samir Suero, Susan Shaffer, Carlos Tejada, Merlyn Smartt McCammon, Chooi Speed, Timothy Silver, David Suarez, Sheilah Scully, Steven Solomon, Anthony Stone, Joyce Sgro, Georgina Santana, Mark Santiago, William Spelman, Evelyn Serrano, Dennis Spedale, Michael Sietz-Honig, James Sherman, Gerard Sercia, Andrew Smukler, Mitchell I Steinberg, John Semonish, John Savarese, Andrew Taylor, Diana Serrano, William Sutton, Michael Santosus, Diana Stone, Izak Teller, Barbara Smalls, Denham Spence, Jerome Smith, Sharon Stokes, Roland Tatzel, Jocelyne Sauer, Israel Shapiro, Debra Slater, Myrtle Smith, Michael Sibbio, Stephan Summa, Anthony Smith, Bruce Stanton, Martin Sevilla, Michelle Tamas, Linda Sparks, David Segal, Peter Sullivan, Charles Sine, James Stirpe, Mariateresa Taussi-Cuscci, Robert Scogna, Ralph Taylor, Stephen H Shane, Huguette Tanis, Alan Shalleck, Lee Sulzberg, Gilda Tennenbaum, Caroline Russell, Wilfredo Sierra, Delilah Santos, Christopher L Sturge, Ernnita Stith, Martin Stillwell, Cal Stuart, Stanley Sherman, Gail H Telleysh, Donald Sexton, John Schmidt, Nancy Savage, Steve Simmons, Nicholas Sansevero, Nicole Tanis, Tammy Stokes, Owen Smith, Jonathan M Shields, Anthony Stokes Pereira, James Semidey, Louis Satriano, Mohammad Tariq, Roger Stapleton, Philip Smith, Anthony Sereno, Stanley Teich, Debbie A Tennant, Leslie Shannon, Collette Smith, Glen Shellrude, Robert Suarez, Dominick Scarcella, Troy Raffi Setrakian, Carl Saunders, Kelly Smith Jr., Kathleen Sullivan, Rod Surut, Julian Shevitz, Diana Sullivan, Michael Sullivan and Jack Edmund Tennyson
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11872
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1605 A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (pc)
December 18, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03md1570. (pc)
December 18, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 18, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Caroline Russell, Nicholas Sansevero, Georgina Santana, Patricia Santanastaso, Mark Santiago, Delilah Santos, Michael Santosus, Louis Satriano, Jocelyne Sauer, Carl Saunders, Nancy Savage, John Savarese, Dominick Scarcella, John Schmidt, Robert Scogna, Sheilah Scully, David Segal, James Semidey, John Semonish, Gerard Sercia, Anthony Sereno, Diana Serrano, Evelyn Serrano, Troy Raffi Setrakian, Martin Sevilla, Donald Sexton, Joyce Sgro, Susan Shaffer, Alan Shalleck, Stephen H Shane, Leslie Shannon, Israel Shapiro, Glen Shellrude, James Sherman, Stanley Sherman, Julian Shevitz, Jonathan M Shields, Michael Sibbio, Wilfredo Sierra, Michael Sietz-Honig, Timothy Silver, Steve Simmons, Terry Simmons, Charles Sine, Debra Slater, Barbara Smalls, Merlyn Smartt McCammon, Anthony Smith, Collette Smith, Jerome Smith, Myrtle Smith, Owen Smith, Philip Smith, Kelly Smith Jr., Andrew Smukler, Steven Solomon, Linda Sparks, Dennis Spedale, Chooi Speed, William Spelman, Denham Spence, Bruce Stanton, Roger Stapleton, Mitchell I Steinberg, Martin Stillwell, James Stirpe, Ernnita Stith, Sharon Stokes, Tammy Stokes, Anthony Stokes Pereira, Anthony Stone, Diana Stone, Cal Stuart, Christopher L Sturge, David Suarez, Robert Suarez, Samir Suero, Diana Sullivan, Kathleen Sullivan, Michael Sullivan, Peter Sullivan, Lee Sulzberg, Stephan Summa, Rod Surut, William Sutton, Michelle Tamas, Huguette Tanis, Nicole Tanis, Mohammad Tariq, Roland Tatzel, Mariateresa Taussi-Cuscci, Andrew Taylor, Ralph Taylor, Stanley Teich, Carlos Tejada, Izak Teller, Gail H Telleysh, Debbie A Tennant, Gilda Tennenbaum, Jack Edmund Tennyson. (Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke dated 12/17/18 re: Request for Inclusion in 03-mdl-1570 Action. Document filed by Caroline Russell, Nicholas Sansevero, Georgina Santana, Patricia Santanastaso, Mark Santiago, Delilah Santos, Michael Santosus, Louis Satriano, Jocelyne Sauer, Carl Saunders, Nancy Savage, John Savarese, Dominick Scarcella, John Schmidt, Robert Scogna, Sheilah Scully, David Segal, James Semidey, John Semonish, Gerard Sercia, Anthony Sereno, Diana Serrano, Evelyn Serrano, Troy Raffi Setrakian, Martin Sevilla, Donald Sexton, Joyce Sgro, Susan Shaffer, Alan Shalleck, Stephen H Shane, Leslie Shannon, Israel Shapiro, Glen Shellrude, James Sherman, Stanley Sherman, Julian Shevitz, Jonathan M Shields, Michael Sibbio, Wilfredo Sierra, Michael Sietz-Honig, Timothy Silver, Steve Simmons, Terry Simmons, Charles Sine, Debra Slater, Barbara Smalls, Merlyn Smartt McCammon, Anthony Smith, Collette Smith, Jerome Smith, Myrtle Smith, Owen Smith, Philip Smith, Kelly Smith Jr., Andrew Smukler, Steven Solomon, Linda Sparks, Dennis Spedale, Chooi Speed, William Spelman, Denham Spence, Bruce Stanton, Roger Stapleton, Mitchell I Steinberg, Martin Stillwell, James Stirpe, Ernnita Stith, Sharon Stokes, Tammy Stokes, Anthony Stokes Pereira, Anthony Stone, Diana Stone, Cal Stuart, Christopher L Sturge, David Suarez, Robert Suarez, Samir Suero, Diana Sullivan, Kathleen Sullivan, Michael Sullivan, Peter Sullivan, Lee Sulzberg, Stephan Summa, Rod Surut, William Sutton, Michelle Tamas, Huguette Tanis, Nicole Tanis, Mohammad Tariq, Roland Tatzel, Mariateresa Taussi-Cuscci, Andrew Taylor, Ralph Taylor, Stanley Teich, Carlos Tejada, Izak Teller, Gail H Telleysh, Debbie A Tennant, Gilda Tennenbaum, Jack Edmund Tennyson.(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke dated 12/17/2018 re: Request for Inclusion in 03-mdl-1570 Action. Document filed by Caroline Russell, Nicholas Sansevero, Georgina Santana, Patricia Santanastaso, Mark Santiago, Delilah Santos, Michael Santosus, Louis Satriano, Jocelyne Sauer, Carl Saunders, Nancy Savage, John Savarese, Dominick Scarcella, John Schmidt, Robert Scogna, Sheilah Scully, David Segal, James Semidey, John Semonish, Gerard Sercia, Anthony Sereno, Diana Serrano, Evelyn Serrano, Troy Raffi Setrakian, Martin Sevilla, Donald Sexton, Joyce Sgro, Susan Shaffer, Alan Shalleck, Stephen H Shane, Leslie Shannon, Israel Shapiro, Glen Shellrude, James Sherman, Stanley Sherman, Julian Shevitz, Jonathan M Shields, Michael Sibbio, Wilfredo Sierra, Michael Sietz-Honig, Timothy Silver, Steve Simmons, Terry Simmons, Charles Sine, Debra Slater, Barbara Smalls, Merlyn Smartt McCammon, Anthony Smith, Collette Smith, Jerome Smith, Myrtle Smith, Owen Smith, Philip Smith, Kelly Smith Jr., Andrew Smukler, Steven Solomon, Linda Sparks, Dennis Spedale, Chooi Speed, William Spelman, Denham Spence, Bruce Stanton, Roger Stapleton, Mitchell I Steinberg, Martin Stillwell, James Stirpe, Ernnita Stith, Sharon Stokes, Tammy Stokes, Anthony Stokes Pereira, Anthony Stone, Diana Stone, Cal Stuart, Christopher L Sturge, David Suarez, Robert Suarez, Samir Suero, Diana Sullivan, Kathleen Sullivan, Michael Sullivan, Peter Sullivan, Lee Sulzberg, Stephan Summa, Rod Surut, William Sutton, Michelle Tamas, Huguette Tanis, Nicole Tanis, Mohammad Tariq, Roland Tatzel, Mariateresa Taussi-Cuscci, Andrew Taylor, Ralph Taylor, Stanley Teich, Carlos Tejada, Izak Teller, Gail H Telleysh, Debbie A Tennant, Gilda Tennenbaum, Jack Edmund Tennyson.(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Caroline Russell, Nicholas Sansevero, Georgina Santana, Patricia Santanastaso, Mark Santiago, Delilah Santos, Michael Santosus, Louis Satriano, Jocelyne Sauer, Carl Saunders, Nancy Savage, John Savarese, Dominick Scarcella, John Schmidt, Robert Scogna, Sheilah Scully, David Segal, James Semidey, John Semonish, Gerard Sercia, Anthony Sereno, Diana Serrano, Evelyn Serrano, Troy Raffi Setrakian, Martin Sevilla, Donald Sexton, Joyce Sgro, Susan Shaffer, Alan Shalleck, Stephen H Shane, Leslie Shannon, Israel Shapiro, Glen Shellrude, James Sherman, Stanley Sherman, Julian Shevitz, Jonathan M Shields, Michael Sibbio, Wilfredo Sierra, Michael Sietz-Honig, Timothy Silver, Steve Simmons, Terry Simmons, Charles Sine, Debra Slater, Barbara Smalls, Merlyn Smartt McCammon, Anthony Smith, Collette Smith, Jerome Smith, Myrtle Smith, Owen Smith, Philip Smith, Kelly Smith Jr., Andrew Smukler, Steven Solomon, Linda Sparks, Dennis Spedale, Chooi Speed, William Spelman, Denham Spence, Bruce Stanton, Roger Stapleton, Mitchell I Steinberg, Martin Stillwell, James Stirpe, Ernnita Stith, Sharon Stokes, Tammy Stokes, Anthony Stokes Pereira, Anthony Stone, Diana Stone, Cal Stuart, Christopher L Sturge, David Suarez, Robert Suarez, Samir Suero, Diana Sullivan, Kathleen Sullivan, Michael Sullivan, Peter Sullivan, Lee Sulzberg, Stephan Summa, Rod Surut, William Sutton, Michelle Tamas, Huguette Tanis, Nicole Tanis, Mohammad Tariq, Roland Tatzel, Mariateresa Taussi-Cuscci, Andrew Taylor, Ralph Taylor, Stanley Teich, Carlos Tejada, Izak Teller, Gail H Telleysh, Debbie A Tennant, Gilda Tennenbaum, Jack Edmund Tennyson.(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16069896)Document filed by Glen Shellrude, Israel Shapiro, Roland Tatzel, Roger Stapleton, Anthony Sereno, Anthony Stone, Louis Satriano, Kathleen Sullivan, Donald Sexton, Gilda Tennenbaum, James Semidey, Diana Stone, David Segal, Charles Sine, Andrew Smukler, Rod Surut, Christopher L Sturge, Joyce Sgro, Carlos Tejada, Linda Sparks, Denham Spence, Gerard Sercia, Andrew Taylor, Mohammad Tariq, Nancy Savage, Leslie Shannon, James Sherman, John Savarese, Mariateresa Taussi-Cuscci, Michael Sullivan, Anthony Smith, Huguette Tanis, Ralph Taylor, Samir Suero, Martin Stillwell, Alan Shalleck, Philip Smith, Wilfredo Sierra, Mitchell I Steinberg, Gail H Telleysh, Dennis Spedale, Timothy Silver, Dominick Scarcella, Sheilah Scully, Peter Sullivan, Collette Smith, William Spelman, Steven Solomon, Cal Stuart, James Stirpe, Debra Slater, Michelle Tamas, David Suarez, John Semonish, Bruce Stanton, Kelly Smith Jr., Ernnita Stith, Anthony Stokes Pereira, Sharon Stokes, Caroline Russell, Georgina Santana, Nicholas Sansevero, Nicole Tanis, Stephen H Shane, Jack Edmund Tennyson, Lee Sulzberg, Martin Sevilla, Susan Shaffer, Stephan Summa, Robert Suarez, Michael Sietz-Honig, Robert Scogna, Tammy Stokes, Chooi Speed, Jerome Smith, Troy Raffi Setrakian, Owen Smith, Diana Sullivan, Evelyn Serrano, Terry Simmons, Barbara Smalls, Diana Serrano, John Schmidt, Izak Teller, Michael Santosus, William Sutton, Patricia Santanastaso, Julian Shevitz, Stanley Teich, Carl Saunders, Myrtle Smith, Merlyn Smartt McCammon, Jocelyne Sauer, Michael Sibbio, Debbie A Tennant, Mark Santiago, Stanley Sherman, Jonathan M Shields, Steve Simmons, Delilah Santos. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix 1)(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sansevero et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Santanastaso
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Simmons
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samir Suero
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Shaffer
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Tejada
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merlyn Smartt McCammon
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chooi Speed
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Silver
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Suarez
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheilah Scully
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Solomon
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Stone
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Sgro
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgina Santana
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Santiago
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Spelman
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Serrano
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Spedale
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sietz-Honig
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sherman
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Sercia
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Smukler
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell I Steinberg
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Semonish
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Savarese
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Taylor
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Serrano
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Sutton
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Santosus
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Stone
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Izak Teller
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Smalls
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denham Spence
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Smith
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Stokes
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Tatzel
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jocelyne Sauer
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Shapiro
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Slater
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtle Smith
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sibbio
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan Summa
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Smith
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Stanton
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Sevilla
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Tamas
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Sparks
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Segal
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Sullivan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Sine
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Stirpe
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariateresa Taussi-Cuscci
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Scogna
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Taylor
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen H Shane
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Tanis
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Shalleck
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Sulzberg
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilda Tennenbaum
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Russell
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Sierra
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delilah Santos
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L Sturge
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernnita Stith
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Stillwell
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cal Stuart
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Sherman
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail H Telleysh
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Sexton
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Schmidt
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Savage
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Simmons
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Sansevero
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Tanis
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Stokes
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owen Smith
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan M Shields
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Stokes Pereira
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Semidey
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Satriano
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Tariq
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Stapleton
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Smith
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Sereno
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Teich
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie A Tennant
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Shannon
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collette Smith
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Shellrude
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Suarez
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Scarcella
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Raffi Setrakian
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Saunders
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Smith Jr.
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Sullivan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rod Surut
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Shevitz
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Sullivan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sullivan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Edmund Tennyson
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?