Cintron-Lugos et al v. Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Trevor Davidson, Charles Cross, Elsie Clark, Shelly Ray Watford, Uriel Rivera, Jr, Erika C Sufilka, Shirley White, Courtland Jerome Clark, Randy Clark, Cathleen Mary Cleary, Joyce Cohen-Day, Juana Colon, Mahadai Dataram, Stanley Alexander, Sean Clark, Stephanie Marie Sampson (Clarke), Regina Coyle, Thomas J Cleary, John Costanza, Rose Davidson, Joseph Coyle, Jaime Concepcion, Jr, Adam Davidson, Kirsy Concepcion Salazar, Daniel Davidson, Mary Patricia Cleary, Virginia Concepcion Desoto, Delores (Monica) Akinshara, Carol Davidson-Simpson, Laura Buck, Brittany Hantz, Danielle Alexander, Ronald Dataram, Orquidia Colon, Virginia Fredriksen, Teresa Cordero, Robert E Marisay, Jr, Uriel Rivera, Sr, Denzil Davidson, Ingrid Rivera, Katherine Coyle, Evis Jones, James Coyle, Helga Curtin, Albertina Rivera, Mandell Conway, Noel Davidson, McCarthy Patricia McAvinu, Sharon McAvinue, Michelle Davidson, Thomas G McAvinue, Janet Davidson, Elizabeth Cleary, LaShawn Clark, Anthony Clark, Moises Cordero, Jr, Mercedes Concepcion, Gabriel Clark, Linda McGee, Marc Davidson, Rosa Colon, Merna Davidson, Phillip Davidson, Carol Cubas, Christopher James Cleary, William Cintron-Lugos, Mio Cloud, Russell Conway, Michael G Cleary, Maureen Cleary Colligan, Sam Davidson, Patricia Mary Cleary, Tanya Dale, Wellington Cordero, William Davidson, Pierre Clark Ta, April Alexander, Reginald Colon, Anand A Dataram, Amy M Knight and Moises Cordero
Defendant: Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11888
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Elliot Strong on behalf of Delores (Monica) Akinshara, April Alexander, Danielle Alexander, Stanley Alexander, Laura Buck(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Georgine R. Corrigan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Georgine R. Corrigan), Laura Buck(individually, as surviving child of Georgine R. Corrigan), William Cintron-Lugos (a/k/a William Cintron, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edna Cintron, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edna Cintron), William Cintron-Lugos (a/k/a William Cintron, individually, as surviving spouse of Edna Cintron), Anthony Clark, Courtland Jerome Clark, Elsie Clark(individually, as surviving parent of Benjamin K. Clark), Gabriel Clark, LaShawn Clark(individually, as surviving spouse of Benjamin K. Clark), LaShawn Clark(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Benjamin K. Clark, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Benjamin K. Clark), Randy Clark, Sean Clark, Elsie Clark (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Benjamin Clark [Sr.], individually, as surviving parent of Benjamin K. Clark), Cathleen Mary Cleary, Christopher James Cleary(individually, as surviving sibling of Kevin F. Cleary), Christopher James Cleary(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin F. Cleary, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kevin F. Cleary), Elizabeth Cleary, Michael G Cleary, Patricia Mary Cleary, Patricia Mary Cleary, Thomas J Cleary, Maureen Cleary Colligan, Mio Cloud(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Geoffrey Cloud, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Geoffrey Cloud), Mio Cloud(individually, as surviving spouse of Geoffrey Cloud), Joyce Cohen-Day(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Florence Cohen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Florence Cohen), Joyce Cohen-Day(individually, as surviving child of Florence Cohen), Juana Colon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jaime Concepcion, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jaime Concepcion), Juana Colon(individually, as surviving spouse of Jaime Concepcion), Orquidia Colon, Reginald Colon, Rosa Colon, Jaime Concepcion, Jr, Mercedes Concepcion, Virginia Concepcion Desoto, Kirsy Concepcion Salazar, Mandell Conway, Russell Conway(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brenda E. Conway, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Brenda E. Conway), Russell Conway(individually, as surviving spouse of Brenda E. Conway), Moises Cordero(individually, as surviving parent of Alejandro Cordero), Moises Cordero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alejandro Cordero, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alejandro Cordero), Teresa Cordero, Wellington Cordero, Moises Cordero, Jr, John Costanza(individually, as surviving spouse of Digna Costanza), John Costanza(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Digna Costanza, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Digna Costanza), James Coyle(individually, as surviving parent of James R. Coyle), James Coyle(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James R. Coyle, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James R. Coyle), Joseph Coyle, Katherine Coyle, Regina Coyle, Charles Cross, Carol Cubas(individually, as surviving spouse of Kenneth J. Cubas), Carol Cubas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth J. Cubas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kenneth J. Cubas), Helga Curtin(individually, as surviving spouse of Michael Curtin), Helga Curtin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Curtin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Curtin), Tanya Dale(individually, as surviving child of Titus Davidson), Tanya Dale(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Titus Davidson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Titus Davidson), Anand A Dataram, Mahadai Dataram(individually, as surviving parent of Annette A. Dataram), Mahadai Dataram(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Annette A. Dataram, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Annette A. Dataram), Ronald Dataram, Adam Davidson(individually, as surviving child of Lawrence Davidson), Adam Davidson(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Lawrence Davidson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lawrence Davidson), Daniel Davidson, Denzil Davidson, Janet Davidson, Marc Davidson, Merna Davidson, Michelle Davidson, Noel Davidson, Phillip Davidson(individually, as surviving sibling of Titus Davidson), Rose Davidson, Sam Davidson, Trevor Davidson, William Davidson, Phillip Davidson (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ragland Davidson, deceased, the late parent of Titus Davidson), Carol Davidson-Simpson, Virginia Fredriksen, Brittany Hantz, Evis Jones, Amy M Knight, Robert E Marisay, Jr, Sharon McAvinue, Thomas G McAvinue, Linda McGee, McCarthy Patricia McAvinu, Albertina Rivera, Ingrid Rivera, Uriel Rivera, Jr, Uriel Rivera, Sr, Stephanie Marie Sampson (Clarke)(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donna Clarke, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donna Clarke), Stephanie Marie Sampson (Clarke)(individually, as surviving child of Donna Clarke), Erika C Sufilka, Pierre Clark Ta, Shelly Ray Watford, Shirley White. (Strong, Bruce)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
January 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 3/21/2019. Document filed by Maureen Cleary Colligan; Teresa Cordero; Ingrid Rivera; Rose Davidson; Thomas G McAvinue; Moises Cordero, Jr; Reginald Colon; Merna Davidson; Kirsy Concepcion Salazar; Carol Davidson-Simpson; Denzil Davidson; Sean Clark; Katherine Coyle; Joyce Cohen-Day(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Florence Cohen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Florence Cohen); Noel Davidson; Rosa Colon; Laura Buck(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Georgine R. Corrigan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Georgine R. Corrigan); Erika C Sufilka; Virginia Concepcion Desoto; Cathleen Mary Cleary; Delores (Monica) Akinshara; Thomas J Cleary; Charles Cross; Linda McGee; Janet Davidson; Uriel Rivera, Jr; William Davidson; Christopher James Cleary(individually, as surviving sibling of Kevin F. Cleary); Patricia Mary Cleary; Anand A Dataram; John Costanza(individually, as surviving spouse of Digna Costanza); Stanley Alexander; James Coyle(individually, as surviving parent of James R. Coyle); Gabriel Clark; Robert E Marisay, Jr; Tanya Dale(individually, as surviving child of Titus Davidson); Mio Cloud(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Geoffrey Cloud, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Geoffrey Cloud); Shelly Ray Watford ; James Coyle(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James R. Coyle, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James R. Coyle); April Alexander; Adam Davidson(individually, as surviving child of Lawrence Davidson); Jaime Concepcion, Jr; Mio Cloud(individually, as surviving spouse of Geoffrey Cloud); Carol Cubas(individually, as surviving spouse of Kenneth J. Cubas); Phillip Davidson(individually, as surviving sibling of Titus Davidson); Mahadai Dataram(individually, as surviving parent of Annette A. Dataram); William Cintron-Lugos (a/k/a William Cintron, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edna Cintron, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edna Cintron); William Cintron-Lugos (a/k/a William Cintron, individually, as surviving spouse of Edna Cintron); Christopher James Cleary(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin F. Cleary, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kevin F. Cleary); Adam Davidson(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Lawrence Davidson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lawrence Davidson); Danielle Alexander; Randy Clark; Albertina Rivera; Michelle Davidson; Moises Cordero(individually, as surviving parent of Alejandro Cordero); Russell Conway(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brenda E. Conway, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Brenda E. Conway); John Costanza(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Digna Costanza, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Digna Costanza); Helga Curtin(individually, as surviving spouse of Michael Curtin); Patricia Mary Cleary; Stephanie Marie Sampson (Clarke)(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donna Clarke, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donna Clarke); Phillip Davidson (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ragland Davidson, deceased, the late parent of Titus Davidson); Virginia Fredriksen; Sam Davidson; Mahadai Dataram(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Annette A. Dataram, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Annette A. Dataram); Stephanie Marie Sampson (Clarke)(individually, as surviving child of Donna Clarke); Russell Conway(individually, as surviving spouse of Brenda E. Conway); Uriel Rivera, Sr; Daniel Davidson; Wellington Cordero; Shirley White; Pierre Clark Ta; Brittany Hantz; Michael G Cleary; Orquidia Colon; Moises Cordero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alejandro Cordero, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alejandro Cordero); Helga Curtin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Curtin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Curtin); Mercedes Concepcion; Elizabeth Cleary; Ronald Dataram; Juana Colon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jaime Concepcion, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jaime Concepcion); Laura Buck(individually, as surviving child of Georgine R. Corrigan); Trevor Davidson; Carol Cubas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth J. Cubas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kenneth J. Cubas); Sharon McAvinue; Regina Coyle; Elsie Clark (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Benjamin Clark [Sr.], individually, as surviving parent of Benjamin K. Clark); Juana Colon(individually, as surviving spouse of Jaime Concepcion); LaShawn Clark(individually, as surviving spouse of Benjamin K. Clark); McCarthy Patricia McAvinu; Amy M Knight; Mandell Conway; Courtland Jerome Clark; Anthony Clark; LaShawn Clark(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Benjamin K. Clark, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Benjamin K. Clark); Tanya Dale(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Titus Davidson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Titus Davidson); Marc Davidson; Joyce Cohen-Day(individually, as surviving child of Florence Cohen); Joseph Coyle; Evis Jones; Elsie Clark(individually, as surviving parent of Benjamin K. Clark). (Goldman, Jerry)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia. (pne)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MDL-1570. Document filed by Delores (Monica) Akinshara, April Alexander, Danielle Alexander, Stanley Alexander, Laura Buck(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Georgine R. Corrigan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Georgine R. Corrigan), Laura Buck(individually, as surviving child of Georgine R. Corrigan), William Cintron-Lugos (a/k/a William Cintron, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edna Cintron, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edna Cintron), William Cintron-Lugos (a/k/a William Cintron, individually, as surviving spouse of Edna Cintron), Anthony Clark, Courtland Jerome Clark, Elsie Clark(individually, as surviving parent of Benjamin K. Clark), Gabriel Clark, LaShawn Clark(individually, as surviving spouse of Benjamin K. Clark), LaShawn Clark(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Benjamin K. Clark, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Benjamin K. Clark), Randy Clark, Sean Clark, Elsie Clark (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Benjamin Clark [Sr.], individually, as surviving parent of Benjamin K. Clark), Cathleen Mary Cleary, Christopher James Cleary(individually, as surviving sibling of Kevin F. Cleary), Christopher James Cleary(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin F. Cleary, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kevin F. Cleary), Elizabeth Cleary, Michael G Cleary, Patricia Mary Cleary, Patricia Mary Cleary, Thomas J Cleary, Maureen Cleary Colligan, Mio Cloud(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Geoffrey Cloud, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Geoffrey Cloud), Mio Cloud(individually, as surviving spouse of Geoffrey Cloud), Joyce Cohen-Day(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Florence Cohen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Florence Cohen), Joyce Cohen-Day(individually, as surviving child of Florence Cohen), Juana Colon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jaime Concepcion, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jaime Concepcion), Juana Colon(individually, as surviving spouse of Jaime Concepcion), Orquidia Colon, Reginald Colon, Rosa Colon, Jaime Concepcion, Jr, Mercedes Concepcion, Virginia Concepcion Desoto, Kirsy Concepcion Salazar, Mandell Conway, Russell Conway(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brenda E. Conway, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Brenda E. Conway), Russell Conway(individually, as surviving spouse of Brenda E. Conway), Moises Cordero(individually, as surviving parent of Alejandro Cordero), Moises Cordero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alejandro Cordero, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alejandro Cordero), Teresa Cordero, Wellington Cordero, Moises Cordero, Jr, John Costanza(individually, as surviving spouse of Digna Costanza), John Costanza(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Digna Costanza, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Digna Costanza), James Coyle(individually, as surviving parent of James R. Coyle), James Coyle(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James R. Coyle, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James R. Coyle), Joseph Coyle, Katherine Coyle, Regina Coyle, Charles Cross, Carol Cubas(individually, as surviving spouse of Kenneth J. Cubas), Carol Cubas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth J. Cubas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kenneth J. Cubas), Helga Curtin(individually, as surviving spouse of Michael Curtin), Helga Curtin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Curtin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Curtin), Tanya Dale(individually, as surviving child of Titus Davidson), Tanya Dale(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Titus Davidson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Titus Davidson), Anand A Dataram, Mahadai Dataram(individually, as surviving parent of Annette A. Dataram), Mahadai Dataram(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Annette A. Dataram, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Annette A. Dataram), Ronald Dataram, Adam Davidson(individually, as surviving child of Lawrence Davidson), Adam Davidson(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Lawrence Davidson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lawrence Davidson), Daniel Davidson, Denzil Davidson, Janet Davidson, Marc Davidson, Merna Davidson, Michelle Davidson, Noel Davidson, Phillip Davidson(individually, as surviving sibling of Titus Davidson), Rose Davidson, Sam Davidson, Trevor Davidson, William Davidson, Phillip Davidson (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ragland Davidson, deceased, the late parent of Titus Davidson), Carol Davidson-Simpson, Virginia Fredriksen, Brittany Hantz, Evis Jones, Amy M Knight, Robert E Marisay, Jr, Sharon McAvinue, Thomas G McAvinue, Linda McGee, McCarthy Patricia McAvinu, Albertina Rivera, Ingrid Rivera, Uriel Rivera, Jr, Uriel Rivera, Sr, Stephanie Marie Sampson (Clarke)(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donna Clarke, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donna Clarke), Stephanie Marie Sampson (Clarke)(individually, as surviving child of Donna Clarke), Erika C Sufilka, Pierre Clark Ta, Shelly Ray Watford, Shirley White.(Goldman, Jerry)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia, re: #5 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Delores (Monica) Akinshara, April Alexander, Danielle Alexander, Stanley Alexander, Laura Buck(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Georgine R. Corrigan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Georgine R. Corrigan), Laura Buck(individually, as surviving child of Georgine R. Corrigan), William Cintron-Lugos (a/k/a William Cintron, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edna Cintron, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edna Cintron), William Cintron-Lugos (a/k/a William Cintron, individually, as surviving spouse of Edna Cintron), Anthony Clark, Courtland Jerome Clark, Elsie Clark(individually, as surviving parent of Benjamin K. Clark), Gabriel Clark, LaShawn Clark(individually, as surviving spouse of Benjamin K. Clark), LaShawn Clark(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Benjamin K. Clark, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Benjamin K. Clark), Randy Clark, Sean Clark, Elsie Clark (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Benjamin Clark [Sr.], individually, as surviving parent of Benjamin K. Clark), Cathleen Mary Cleary, Christopher James Cleary(individually, as surviving sibling of Kevin F. Cleary), Christopher James Cleary(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin F. Cleary, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kevin F. Cleary), Elizabeth Cleary, Michael G Cleary, Patricia Mary Cleary, Patricia Mary Cleary, Thomas J Cleary, Maureen Cleary Colligan, Mio Cloud(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Geoffrey Cloud, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Geoffrey Cloud), Mio Cloud(individually, as surviving spouse of Geoffrey Cloud), Joyce Cohen-Day(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Florence Cohen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Florence Cohen), Joyce Cohen-Day(individually, as surviving child of Florence Cohen), Juana Colon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jaime Concepcion, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jaime Concepcion), Juana Colon(individually, as surviving spouse of Jaime Concepcion), Orquidia Colon, Reginald Colon, Rosa Colon, Jaime Concepcion, Jr, Mercedes Concepcion, Virginia Concepcion Desoto, Kirsy Concepcion Salazar, Mandell Conway, Russell Conway(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brenda E. Conway, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Brenda E. Conway), Russell Conway(individually, as surviving spouse of Brenda E. Conway), Moises Cordero(individually, as surviving parent of Alejandro Cordero), Moises Cordero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alejandro Cordero, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alejandro Cordero), Teresa Cordero, Wellington Cordero, Moises Cordero, Jr, John Costanza(individually, as surviving spouse of Digna Costanza), John Costanza(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Digna Costanza, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Digna Costanza), James Coyle(individually, as surviving parent of James R. Coyle), James Coyle(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James R. Coyle, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James R. Coyle), Joseph Coyle, Katherine Coyle, Regina Coyle, Charles Cross, Carol Cubas(individually, as surviving spouse of Kenneth J. Cubas), Carol Cubas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth J. Cubas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kenneth J. Cubas), Helga Curtin(individually, as surviving spouse of Michael Curtin), Helga Curtin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Curtin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Curtin), Tanya Dale(individually, as surviving child of Titus Davidson), Tanya Dale(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Titus Davidson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Titus Davidson), Anand A Dataram, Mahadai Dataram(individually, as surviving parent of Annette A. Dataram), Mahadai Dataram(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Annette A. Dataram, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Annette A. Dataram), Ronald Dataram, Adam Davidson(individually, as surviving child of Lawrence Davidson), Adam Davidson(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Lawrence Davidson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lawrence Davidson), Daniel Davidson, Denzil Davidson, Janet Davidson, Marc Davidson, Merna Davidson, Michelle Davidson, Noel Davidson, Phillip Davidson(individually, as surviving sibling of Titus Davidson), Rose Davidson, Sam Davidson, Trevor Davidson, William Davidson, Phillip Davidson (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ragland Davidson, deceased, the late parent of Titus Davidson), Carol Davidson-Simpson, Virginia Fredriksen, Brittany Hantz, Evis Jones, Amy M Knight, Robert E Marisay, Jr, Sharon McAvinue, Thomas G McAvinue, Linda McGee, McCarthy Patricia McAvinu, Albertina Rivera, Ingrid Rivera, Uriel Rivera, Jr, Uriel Rivera, Sr, Stephanie Marie Sampson (Clarke)(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donna Clarke, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donna Clarke), Stephanie Marie Sampson (Clarke)(individually, as surviving child of Donna Clarke), Erika C Sufilka, Pierre Clark Ta, Shelly Ray Watford, Shirley White. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Maureen Cleary Colligan, Teresa Cordero, Ingrid Rivera, Rose Davidson, Thomas G McAvinue, Moises Cordero, Jr, Reginald Colon, Merna Davidson, Kirsy Concepcion Salazar, Carol Davidson-Simpson, Denzil Davidson, Sean Clark, Katherine Coyle, Joyce Cohen-Day(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Florence Cohen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Florence Cohen), Noel Davidson, Rosa Colon, Laura Buck(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Georgine R. Corrigan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Georgine R. Corrigan), Erika C Sufilka, Virginia Concepcion Desoto, Cathleen Mary Cleary, Delores (Monica) Akinshara, Thomas J Cleary, Charles Cross, Linda McGee, Janet Davidson, Uriel Rivera, Jr, William Davidson, Christopher James Cleary(individually, as surviving sibling of Kevin F. Cleary), Patricia Mary Cleary, Anand A Dataram, John Costanza(individually, as surviving spouse of Digna Costanza), Stanley Alexander, James Coyle(individually, as surviving parent of James R. Coyle), Gabriel Clark, Robert E Marisay, Jr, Tanya Dale(individually, as surviving child of Titus Davidson), Mio Cloud(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Geoffrey Cloud, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Geoffrey Cloud), Shelly Ray Watford, James Coyle(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James R. Coyle, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James R. Coyle), April Alexander, Adam Davidson(individually, as surviving child of Lawrence Davidson), Jaime Concepcion, Jr, Mio Cloud(individually, as surviving spouse of Geoffrey Cloud), Carol Cubas(individually, as surviving spouse of Kenneth J. Cubas), Phillip Davidson(individually, as surviving sibling of Titus Davidson), Mahadai Dataram(individually, as surviving parent of Annette A. Dataram), William Cintron-Lugos (a/k/a William Cintron, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edna Cintron, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edna Cintron), William Cintron-Lugos (a/k/a William Cintron, individually, as surviving spouse of Edna Cintron), Christopher James Cleary(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin F. Cleary, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kevin F. Cleary), Adam Davidson(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Lawrence Davidson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lawrence Davidson), Danielle Alexander, Randy Clark, Albertina Rivera, Michelle Davidson, Moises Cordero(individually, as surviving parent of Alejandro Cordero), Russell Conway(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brenda E. Conway, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Brenda E. Conway), John Costanza(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Digna Costanza, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Digna Costanza), Helga Curtin(individually, as surviving spouse of Michael Curtin), Patricia Mary Cleary, Stephanie Marie Sampson (Clarke)(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donna Clarke, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donna Clarke), Phillip Davidson (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ragland Davidson, deceased, the late parent of Titus Davidson), Virginia Fredriksen, Sam Davidson, Mahadai Dataram(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Annette A. Dataram, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Annette A. Dataram), Stephanie Marie Sampson (Clarke)(individually, as surviving child of Donna Clarke), Russell Conway(individually, as surviving spouse of Brenda E. Conway), Uriel Rivera, Sr, Daniel Davidson, Wellington Cordero, Shirley White, Pierre Clark Ta, Brittany Hantz, Michael G Cleary, Orquidia Colon, Moises Cordero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alejandro Cordero, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alejandro Cordero), Helga Curtin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Curtin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Curtin), Mercedes Concepcion, Elizabeth Cleary, Ronald Dataram, Juana Colon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jaime Concepcion, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jaime Concepcion), Laura Buck(individually, as surviving child of Georgine R. Corrigan), Trevor Davidson, Carol Cubas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth J. Cubas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kenneth J. Cubas), Sharon McAvinue, Regina Coyle, Elsie Clark (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Benjamin Clark [Sr.], individually, as surviving parent of Benjamin K. Clark), Juana Colon(individually, as surviving spouse of Jaime Concepcion), LaShawn Clark(individually, as surviving spouse of Benjamin K. Clark), McCarthy Patricia McAvinu, Amy M Knight, Mandell Conway, Courtland Jerome Clark, Anthony Clark, LaShawn Clark(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Benjamin K. Clark, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Benjamin K. Clark), Tanya Dale(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Titus Davidson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Titus Davidson), Marc Davidson, Joyce Cohen-Day(individually, as surviving child of Florence Cohen), Joseph Coyle, Evis Jones, Elsie Clark(individually, as surviving parent of Benjamin K. Clark).(Goldman, Jerry)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $999999999000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9999000;. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the related case statement;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Patricia Mary Cleary. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MDL-1570. Document filed by Delores (Monica) Akinshara, April Alexander, Danielle Alexander, Stanley Alexander, Laura Buck(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Georgine R. Corrigan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Georgine R. Corrigan), Laura Buck(individually, as surviving child of Georgine R. Corrigan), William Cintron-Lugos (a/k/a William Cintron, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edna Cintron, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edna Cintron), William Cintron-Lugos (a/k/a William Cintron, individually, as surviving spouse of Edna Cintron), Anthony Clark, Courtland Jerome Clark, Elsie Clark(individually, as surviving parent of Benjamin K. Clark), Gabriel Clark, LaShawn Clark(individually, as surviving spouse of Benjamin K. Clark), LaShawn Clark(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Benjamin K. Clark, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Benjamin K. Clark), Randy Clark, Sean Clark, Elsie Clark (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Benjamin Clark [Sr.], individually, as surviving parent of Benjamin K. Clark), Cathleen Mary Cleary, Christopher James Cleary(individually, as surviving sibling of Kevin F. Cleary), Christopher James Cleary(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin F. Cleary, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kevin F. Cleary), Elizabeth Cleary, Mary Patricia Cleary, Michael G Cleary, Patricia Mary Cleary, Thomas J Cleary, Maureen Cleary Colligan, Mio Cloud(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Geoffrey Cloud, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Geoffrey Cloud), Mio Cloud(individually, as surviving spouse of Geoffrey Cloud), Joyce Cohen-Day(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Florence Cohen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Florence Cohen), Joyce Cohen-Day(individually, as surviving child of Florence Cohen), Juana Colon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jaime Concepcion, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jaime Concepcion), Juana Colon(individually, as surviving spouse of Jaime Concepcion), Orquidia Colon, Reginald Colon, Rosa Colon, Jaime Concepcion, Jr, Mercedes Concepcion, Virginia Concepcion Desoto, Kirsy Concepcion Salazar, Mandell Conway, Russell Conway(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brenda E. Conway, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Brenda E. Conway), Russell Conway(individually, as surviving spouse of Brenda E. Conway), Moises Cordero(individually, as surviving parent of Alejandro Cordero), Moises Cordero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alejandro Cordero, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alejandro Cordero), Teresa Cordero, Wellington Cordero, Moises Cordero, Jr, John Costanza(individually, as surviving spouse of Digna Costanza), John Costanza(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Digna Costanza, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Digna Costanza), James Coyle(individually, as surviving parent of James R. Coyle), James Coyle(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James R. Coyle, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James R. Coyle), Joseph Coyle, Katherine Coyle, Regina Coyle, Charles Cross, Carol Cubas(individually, as surviving spouse of Kenneth J. Cubas), Carol Cubas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth J. Cubas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kenneth J. Cubas), Helga Curtin(individually, as surviving spouse of Michael Curtin), Helga Curtin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Curtin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Curtin), Tanya Dale(individually, as surviving child of Titus Davidson), Tanya Dale(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Titus Davidson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Titus Davidson), Anand A Dataram, Mahadai Dataram(individually, as surviving parent of Annette A. Dataram), Mahadai Dataram(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Annette A. Dataram, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Annette A. Dataram), Ronald Dataram, Adam Davidson(individually, as surviving child of Lawrence Davidson), Adam Davidson(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Lawrence Davidson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lawrence Davidson), Daniel Davidson, Denzil Davidson, Janet Davidson, Marc Davidson, Merna Davidson, Michelle Davidson, Noel Davidson, Phillip Davidson(individually, as surviving sibling of Titus Davidson), Rose Davidson, Sam Davidson, Trevor Davidson, William Davidson, Phillip Davidson (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ragland Davidson, deceased, the late parent of Titus Davidson), Carol Davidson-Simpson, Virginia Fredriksen, Brittany Hantz, Evis Jones, Amy M Knight, Robert E Marisay, Jr, Sharon McAvinue, Thomas G McAvinue, Linda McGee, McCarthy Patricia McAvinu, Albertina Rivera, Ingrid Rivera, Uriel Rivera, Jr, Uriel Rivera, Sr, Stephanie Marie Sampson (Clarke)(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donna Clarke, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donna Clarke), Stephanie Marie Sampson (Clarke)(individually, as surviving child of Donna Clarke), Erika C Sufilka, Pierre Clark Ta, Shelly Ray Watford, Shirley White.(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jgo).
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Delores (Monica) Akinshara, April Alexander, Danielle Alexander, Stanley Alexander, Laura Buck(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Georgine R. Corrigan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Georgine R. Corrigan), Laura Buck(individually, as surviving child of Georgine R. Corrigan), William Cintron-Lugos (a/k/a William Cintron, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edna Cintron, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edna Cintron), William Cintron-Lugos (a/k/a William Cintron, individually, as surviving spouse of Edna Cintron), Anthony Clark, Courtland Jerome Clark, Elsie Clark(individually, as surviving parent of Benjamin K. Clark), Gabriel Clark, LaShawn Clark(individually, as surviving spouse of Benjamin K. Clark), LaShawn Clark(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Benjamin K. Clark, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Benjamin K. Clark), Randy Clark, Sean Clark, Elsie Clark (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Benjamin Clark [Sr.], individually, as surviving parent of Benjamin K. Clark), Cathleen Mary Cleary, Christopher James Cleary(individually, as surviving sibling of Kevin F. Cleary), Christopher James Cleary(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin F. Cleary, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kevin F. Cleary), Elizabeth Cleary, Mary Patricia Cleary, Michael G Cleary, Patricia Mary Cleary, Thomas J Cleary, Maureen Cleary Colligan, Mio Cloud(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Geoffrey Cloud, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Geoffrey Cloud), Mio Cloud(individually, as surviving spouse of Geoffrey Cloud), Joyce Cohen-Day(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Florence Cohen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Florence Cohen), Joyce Cohen-Day(individually, as surviving child of Florence Cohen), Juana Colon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jaime Concepcion, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jaime Concepcion), Juana Colon(individually, as surviving spouse of Jaime Concepcion), Orquidia Colon, Reginald Colon, Rosa Colon, Jaime Concepcion, Jr, Mercedes Concepcion, Virginia Concepcion Desoto, Kirsy Concepcion Salazar, Mandell Conway, Russell Conway(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brenda E. Conway, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Brenda E. Conway), Russell Conway(individually, as surviving spouse of Brenda E. Conway), Moises Cordero(individually, as surviving parent of Alejandro Cordero), Moises Cordero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alejandro Cordero, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alejandro Cordero), Teresa Cordero, Wellington Cordero, Moises Cordero, Jr, John Costanza(individually, as surviving spouse of Digna Costanza), John Costanza(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Digna Costanza, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Digna Costanza), James Coyle(individually, as surviving parent of James R. Coyle), James Coyle(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James R. Coyle, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James R. Coyle), Joseph Coyle, Katherine Coyle, Regina Coyle, Charles Cross, Carol Cubas(individually, as surviving spouse of Kenneth J. Cubas), Carol Cubas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth J. Cubas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kenneth J. Cubas), Helga Curtin(individually, as surviving spouse of Michael Curtin), Helga Curtin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Curtin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Curtin), Tanya Dale(individually, as surviving child of Titus Davidson), Tanya Dale(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Titus Davidson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Titus Davidson), Anand A Dataram, Mahadai Dataram(individually, as surviving parent of Annette A. Dataram), Mahadai Dataram(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Annette A. Dataram, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Annette A. Dataram), Ronald Dataram, Adam Davidson(individually, as surviving child of Lawrence Davidson), Adam Davidson(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Lawrence Davidson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lawrence Davidson), Daniel Davidson, Denzil Davidson, Janet Davidson, Marc Davidson, Merna Davidson, Michelle Davidson, Noel Davidson, Phillip Davidson(individually, as surviving sibling of Titus Davidson), Rose Davidson, Sam Davidson, Trevor Davidson, William Davidson, Phillip Davidson (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ragland Davidson, deceased, the late parent of Titus Davidson), Carol Davidson-Simpson, Virginia Fredriksen, Brittany Hantz, Evis Jones, Amy M Knight, Robert E Marisay, Jr, Sharon McAvinue, Thomas G McAvinue, Linda McGee, McCarthy Patricia McAvinu, Albertina Rivera, Ingrid Rivera, Uriel Rivera, Jr, Uriel Rivera, Sr, Stephanie Marie Sampson (Clarke)(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donna Clarke, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donna Clarke), Stephanie Marie Sampson (Clarke)(individually, as surviving child of Donna Clarke), Erika C Sufilka, Pierre Clark Ta, Shelly Ray Watford, Shirley White. (Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jgo).
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16070832)Document filed by William Cintron-Lugos (a/k/a William Cintron, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edna Cintron, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edna Cintron), William Cintron-Lugos (a/k/a William Cintron, individually, as surviving spouse of Edna Cintron), Elsie Clark (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Benjamin Clark [Sr.], individually, as surviving parent of Benjamin K. Clark), LaShawn Clark(individually, as surviving spouse of Benjamin K. Clark), LaShawn Clark(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Benjamin K. Clark, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Benjamin K. Clark), Elsie Clark(individually, as surviving parent of Benjamin K. Clark), Daniel Davidson, Katherine Coyle, Carol Davidson-Simpson, Delores (Monica) Akinshara, Juana Colon, Brittany Hantz, Reginald Colon, Stephanie Marie Sampson (Clarke), Michelle Davidson, Teresa Cordero, Marc Davidson, Juana Colon, Anthony Clark, Mahadai Dataram, Ronald Dataram, Joyce Cohen-Day, Carol Cubas, William Davidson, Anand A Dataram, Robert E Marisay, Jr, Jaime Concepcion, Jr, Mio Cloud, Gabriel Clark, Tanya Dale, Adam Davidson, John Costanza, Shelly Ray Watford, Phillip Davidson, Mio Cloud, Sean Clark, Rosa Colon, April Alexander, Uriel Rivera, Jr, Moises Cordero, Jr, John Costanza, Noel Davidson, James Coyle, Adam Davidson, Ingrid Rivera, Thomas J Cleary, McCarthy Patricia McAvinu, Sharon McAvinue, Tanya Dale, Russell Conway, Thomas G McAvinue, Helga Curtin, Mary Patricia Cleary, Cathleen Mary Cleary, Helga Curtin, Wellington Cordero, James Coyle, Randy Clark, Rose Davidson, Phillip Davidson, Elizabeth Cleary, Moises Cordero, Regina Coyle, Patricia Mary Cleary, Mercedes Concepcion, Joyce Cohen-Day, Sam Davidson, Danielle Alexander, Stanley Alexander, Michael G Cleary, Janet Davidson, Moises Cordero, Mandell Conway, Charles Cross, Orquidia Colon, Linda McGee, Trevor Davidson, Virginia Fredriksen, Laura Buck, Amy M Knight, Denzil Davidson, Joseph Coyle, Christopher James Cleary, Russell Conway, Maureen Cleary Colligan, Shirley White, Christopher James Cleary, Courtland Jerome Clark, Pierre Clark Ta, Merna Davidson, Erika C Sufilka, Uriel Rivera, Sr, Albertina Rivera, Mahadai Dataram, Laura Buck, Stephanie Marie Sampson (Clarke), Virginia Concepcion Desoto, Evis Jones, Carol Cubas, Kirsy Concepcion Salazar.(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cintron-Lugos et al v. Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Davidson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Cross
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsie Clark
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Ray Watford
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uriel Rivera, Jr
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika C Sufilka
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley White
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtland Jerome Clark
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Clark
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathleen Mary Cleary
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Cohen-Day
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Colon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahadai Dataram
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Alexander
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Clark
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Marie Sampson (Clarke)
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Coyle
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J Cleary
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Costanza
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Davidson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Coyle
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Concepcion, Jr
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Davidson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirsy Concepcion Salazar
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Davidson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Patricia Cleary
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Concepcion Desoto
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores (Monica) Akinshara
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Davidson-Simpson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Buck
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Hantz
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Alexander
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Dataram
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orquidia Colon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Fredriksen
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Cordero
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E Marisay, Jr
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uriel Rivera, Sr
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denzil Davidson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Rivera
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Coyle
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evis Jones
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Coyle
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helga Curtin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albertina Rivera
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandell Conway
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Davidson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McCarthy Patricia McAvinu
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon McAvinue
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Davidson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas G McAvinue
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Davidson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Cleary
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaShawn Clark
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Clark
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises Cordero, Jr
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Concepcion
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Clark
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda McGee
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Davidson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Colon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merna Davidson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Davidson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Cubas
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher James Cleary
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Cintron-Lugos
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mio Cloud
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Conway
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G Cleary
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Cleary Colligan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Davidson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Mary Cleary
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Dale
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wellington Cordero
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Davidson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre Clark Ta
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Alexander
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Colon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anand A Dataram
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy M Knight
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises Cordero
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?