Soulas v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Katherine Soulas, Estate of Jeanmarie Wallendorf, Frederick Soulas, Korry Smith, Eytan Yammer, Daniel Huber, Samuel Collazo, Estate of Paul K. Sloan, Stephen Soulas, Brielle Saracini, Estate of Timothy P. Soulas, Leonardo Collazo, Estate of Louise Borzumato, Matthew Soulas, Jeffrey Tino, Estate of Jennifer Tino, Joseph Nicklo, John Barton, Geraldine D. Spaeter, Estate of Sandra Wright-Cartledge, Loretta Haines, Kevin Smith, Diane Smith, Christine Jackson, Christopher Barton, Jessica Kramer, Naomi-Ruth Shefi, Tawanda Smith, D.S., a minor, Raymond Smith, Jr., Kristyn Steiner-Martin, Sarah Funk, Edward Straub, Dian Dembinski, Joan E. Tino, Raymond A. Smith, Barbara Hargrove, Frederick Soulas, III, Jason Smith, Estate of Deborah Sallad, Christi Pendergraft, Pamela Schiele, Patricia Mason, Michael Straub, Anthony Freidman-Ceraso, Carl Smith, Paul Schertzer, Addison Freidman, Victor Santillan, Jack Bradish, Kristen Druckenmiller, Lori Brody, Lance Ward, Jonathan Straub, Expedito C. Santillan, Andrew J. Soulas, Nina Fuller, Latricia Smith, Kirsten Saracini, Stanley Straub, Nicole Soulas, Norma Ward, Patricia Sloan, Estate of Marion Thomas, Aaron Straub, Timothy P. Soulas, Jr., Raymond Wood, Ronald S. Sloan, Danielle Smith, Scott Wood, Michelle Donlan, Christine Barton, Raymond Santillan, Troia Johnson, Dan Soulas, Estate of Gail Smith, Martin Smith, Tanya Warren, Gabriella Rinehart, Ellen Schertzer, Roy-Yetkutiel Shefi, Estate of George Eric Smith, Marc Ward, Ester Santillan, Mellanie Chafe, Stephen Bradish, Matt Sloan, Christopher Soulas, Stephanie Feher, Matthew Straub, Elania Smith-Wyle, Salvatore Tino, Jr. and Salvatore Tino, III
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Petitioner: Kaitlin Steiner-Keller and Mike Smith
Case Number: 1:2018cv11909
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 11, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
January 11, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 11, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (dnh)
December 23, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #2 Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by D.S., a minor, Christine Barton, Christopher Barton, John Barton, Jack Bradish, Stephen Bradish, Lori Brody, Mellanie Chafe, Leonardo Collazo, Samuel Collazo, Estate of Deborah Sallad, Dian Dembinski, Michelle Donlan, Kristen Druckenmiller, Stephanie Feher, Addison Freidman, Anthony Freidman-Ceraso, Nina Fuller, Sarah Funk, Estate of Gail Smith, Estate of George Eric Smith, Loretta Haines, Barbara Hargrove, Daniel Huber, Christine Jackson, Estate of Jeanmarie Wallendorf, Estate of Jennifer Tino, Troia Johnson, Jessica Kramer, Estate of Louise Borzumato, Estate of Marion Thomas, Patricia Mason, Joseph Nicklo, Estate of Paul K. Sloan, Christi Pendergraft, Gabriella Rinehart, Estate of Sandra Wright-Cartledge, Ester Santillan, Expedito C. Santillan, Raymond Santillan, Victor Santillan, Brielle Saracini, Kirsten Saracini, Ellen Schertzer, Paul Schertzer, Pamela Schiele, Naomi-Ruth Shefi, Roy-Yetkutiel Shefi, Matt Sloan, Ronald S. Sloan, Patricia Sloan, Carl Smith, Danielle Smith, Diane Smith, Jason Smith, Kevin Smith, Korry Smith, Latricia Smith, Martin Smith, Mike Smith, Raymond A. Smith, Tawanda Smith, Raymond Smith, Jr., Elania Smith-Wyle, Andrew J. Soulas, Dan Soulas, Frederick Soulas, Katherine Soulas, Matthew Soulas, Nicole Soulas, Stephen Soulas, Christopher Soulas, Frederick Soulas, III, Timothy P. Soulas, Jr., Geraldine D. Spaeter, Kaitlin Steiner-Keller, Kristyn Steiner-Martin, Aaron Straub, Edward Straub, Jonathan Straub, Matthew Straub, Michael Straub, Stanley Straub, Estate of Timothy P. Soulas, Jeffrey Tino, Joan E. Tino, Salvatore Tino, III, Salvatore Tino, Jr., Lance Ward, Marc Ward, Norma Ward, Tanya Warren, Raymond Wood, Scott Wood, Eytan Yammer. (Fleming, Timothy)
December 23, 2018 Filing 6 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by D.S., a minor, Christine Barton, Christopher Barton, John Barton, Jack Bradish, Stephen Bradish, Lori Brody, Mellanie Chafe, Leonardo Collazo, Samuel Collazo, Estate of Deborah Sallad, Dian Dembinski, Michelle Donlan, Kristen Druckenmiller, Stephanie Feher, Addison Freidman, Anthony Freidman-Ceraso, Nina Fuller, Sarah Funk, Estate of Gail Smith, Estate of George Eric Smith, Loretta Haines, Barbara Hargrove, Daniel Huber, Christine Jackson, Estate of Jeanmarie Wallendorf, Estate of Jennifer Tino, Troia Johnson, Jessica Kramer, Estate of Louise Borzumato, Estate of Marion Thomas, Patricia Mason, Joseph Nicklo, Estate of Paul K. Sloan, Christi Pendergraft, Gabriella Rinehart, Estate of Sandra Wright-Cartledge, Ester Santillan, Expedito C. Santillan, Raymond Santillan, Victor Santillan, Brielle Saracini, Kirsten Saracini, Ellen Schertzer, Paul Schertzer, Pamela Schiele, Naomi-Ruth Shefi, Roy-Yetkutiel Shefi, Matt Sloan, Ronald S. Sloan, Patricia Sloan, Carl Smith, Danielle Smith, Diane Smith, Jason Smith, Kevin Smith, Korry Smith, Latricia Smith, Martin Smith, Mike Smith, Raymond A. Smith, Tawanda Smith, Raymond Smith, Jr., Elania Smith-Wyle, Andrew J. Soulas, Dan Soulas, Frederick Soulas, Katherine Soulas, Matthew Soulas, Nicole Soulas, Stephen Soulas, Christopher Soulas, Frederick Soulas, III, Timothy P. Soulas, Jr., Geraldine D. Spaeter, Kaitlin Steiner-Keller, Kristyn Steiner-Martin, Aaron Straub, Edward Straub, Jonathan Straub, Matthew Straub, Michael Straub, Stanley Straub, Estate of Timothy P. Soulas, Jeffrey Tino, Joan E. Tino, Salvatore Tino, III, Salvatore Tino, Jr., Lance Ward, Marc Ward, Norma Ward, Tanya Warren, Raymond Wood, Scott Wood, Eytan Yammer.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 23, 2018 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:03-md-01750. Document filed by D.S., a minor, Christine Barton, Christopher Barton, John Barton, Jack Bradish, Stephen Bradish, Lori Brody, Mellanie Chafe, Leonardo Collazo, Samuel Collazo, Estate of Deborah Sallad, Dian Dembinski, Michelle Donlan, Kristen Druckenmiller, Stephanie Feher, Addison Freidman, Anthony Freidman-Ceraso, Nina Fuller, Sarah Funk, Estate of Gail Smith, Estate of George Eric Smith, Loretta Haines, Barbara Hargrove, Daniel Huber, Christine Jackson, Estate of Jeanmarie Wallendorf, Estate of Jennifer Tino, Troia Johnson, Jessica Kramer, Estate of Louise Borzumato, Estate of Marion Thomas, Patricia Mason, Joseph Nicklo, Estate of Paul K. Sloan, Christi Pendergraft, Gabriella Rinehart, Estate of Sandra Wright-Cartledge, Ester Santillan, Expedito C. Santillan, Raymond Santillan, Victor Santillan, Brielle Saracini, Kirsten Saracini, Ellen Schertzer, Paul Schertzer, Pamela Schiele, Naomi-Ruth Shefi, Roy-Yetkutiel Shefi, Matt Sloan, Ronald S. Sloan, Patricia Sloan, Carl Smith, Danielle Smith, Diane Smith, Jason Smith, Kevin Smith, Korry Smith, Latricia Smith, Martin Smith, Mike Smith, Raymond A. Smith, Tawanda Smith, Raymond Smith, Jr., Elania Smith-Wyle, Andrew J. Soulas, Dan Soulas, Frederick Soulas, Katherine Soulas, Matthew Soulas, Nicole Soulas, Stephen Soulas, Christopher Soulas, Frederick Soulas, III, Timothy P. Soulas, Jr., Geraldine D. Spaeter, Kaitlin Steiner-Keller, Kristyn Steiner-Martin, Aaron Straub, Edward Straub, Jonathan Straub, Matthew Straub, Michael Straub, Stanley Straub, Estate of Timothy P. Soulas, Jeffrey Tino, Joan E. Tino, Salvatore Tino, III, Salvatore Tino, Jr., Lance Ward, Marc Ward, Norma Ward, Tanya Warren, Raymond Wood, Scott Wood, Eytan Yammer.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 23, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fleming, Timothy)
December 23, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Stanley Straub, Estate of Deborah Sallad, Roy-Yetkutiel Shefi, Brielle Saracini, Ellen Schertzer, Matt Sloan, Nina Fuller, Leonardo Collazo, Latricia Smith, Jonathan Straub, Martin Smith, Frederick Soulas, Sarah Funk, Paul Schertzer, Geraldine D. Spaeter, Estate of Timothy P. Soulas, Loretta Haines, Estate of Paul K. Sloan, Christine Jackson, Samuel Collazo, Estate of Jennifer Tino, Eytan Yammer, Tanya Warren, Aaron Straub, Christopher Soulas, Jeffrey Tino, Stephen Soulas, Raymond A. Smith, Addison Freidman, Lance Ward, Raymond Santillan, Estate of Gail Smith, Mellanie Chafe, Estate of Marion Thomas, Frederick Soulas, III, Christine Barton, Mike Smith, Estate of George Eric Smith, Estate of Jeanmarie Wallendorf, Patricia Mason, Matthew Soulas, Danielle Smith, Raymond Wood, Expedito C. Santillan, Ronald S. Sloan, Nicole Soulas, Kirsten Saracini, Korry Smith, Kevin Smith, Michael Straub, Katherine Soulas, Naomi-Ruth Shefi, Andrew J. Soulas, Tawanda Smith, Estate of Sandra Wright-Cartledge, Patricia Sloan, Michelle Donlan, Norma Ward, Kristen Druckenmiller, Lori Brody, Marc Ward, Kristyn Steiner-Martin, Christi Pendergraft, Diane Smith, Ester Santillan, Victor Santillan, Joan E. Tino, Pamela Schiele, Barbara Hargrove, Estate of Louise Borzumato, Dian Dembinski, Salvatore Tino, III, Anthony Freidman-Ceraso, Troia Johnson, Jason Smith, Gabriella Rinehart, Raymond Smith, Jr., Stephanie Feher, D.S., a minor, Christopher Barton, Stephen Bradish, Daniel Huber, Timothy P. Soulas, Jr., Carl Smith, Jack Bradish, John Barton, Salvatore Tino, Jr., Scott Wood, Matthew Straub, Kaitlin Steiner-Keller, Edward Straub, Dan Soulas, Jessica Kramer, Elania Smith-Wyle, Joseph Nicklo.(Fleming, Timothy) Modified on 12/27/2018 (dnh). Modified on 12/27/2018 (dnh).
December 23, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Stanley Straub, Estate of Deborah Sallad, Roy-Yetkutiel Shefi, Brielle Saracini, Ellen Schertzer, Matt Sloan, Nina Fuller, Leonardo Collazo, Latricia Smith, Jonathan Straub, Martin Smith, Frederick Soulas, Sarah Funk, Paul Schertzer, Geraldine D. Spaeter, Estate of Timothy P. Soulas, Loretta Haines, Estate of Paul K. Sloan, Christine Jackson, Samuel Collazo, Estate of Jennifer Tino, Eytan Yammer, Tanya Warren, Aaron Straub, Christopher Soulas, Jeffrey Tino, Stephen Soulas, Raymond A. Smith, Addison Freidman, Lance Ward, Raymond Santillan, Estate of Gail Smith, Mellanie Chafe, Estate of Marion Thomas, Frederick Soulas, III, Christine Barton, Mike Smith, Estate of George Eric Smith, Estate of Jeanmarie Wallendorf, Patricia Mason, Matthew Soulas, Danielle Smith, Raymond Wood, Expedito C. Santillan, Ronald S. Sloan, Nicole Soulas, Kirsten Saracini, Korry Smith, Kevin Smith, Michael Straub, Katherine Soulas, Naomi-Ruth Shefi, Andrew J. Soulas, Tawanda Smith, Estate of Sandra Wright-Cartledge, Patricia Sloan, Michelle Donlan, Norma Ward, Kristen Druckenmiller, Lori Brody, Marc Ward, Kristyn Steiner-Martin, Christi Pendergraft, Diane Smith, Ester Santillan, Victor Santillan, Joan E. Tino, Pamela Schiele, Barbara Hargrove, Estate of Louise Borzumato, Dian Dembinski, Salvatore Tino, III, Anthony Freidman-Ceraso, Troia Johnson, Jason Smith, Gabriella Rinehart, Raymond Smith, Jr., Stephanie Feher, D.S., a minor, Christopher Barton, Stephen Bradish, Daniel Huber, Timothy P. Soulas, Jr., Carl Smith, Jack Bradish, John Barton, Salvatore Tino, Jr., Scott Wood, Matthew Straub, Kaitlin Steiner-Keller, Edward Straub, Dan Soulas, Jessica Kramer, Elania Smith-Wyle, Joseph Nicklo. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Mike Smith, Stephen Bradish, Lance Ward, Jessica Kramer, Christi Pendergraft, Loretta Haines, Estate of Sandra Wright-Cartledge, Dian Dembinski, Patricia Mason, Norma Ward, Geraldine D. Spaeter, Eytan Yammer, Jason Smith, Marc Ward, Jack Bradish added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Mike Smith, Stephen Bradish, Lance Ward, Jessica Kramer, Christi Pendergraft, Loretta Haines, Estate of Sandra Wright-Cartledge, Dian Dembinski, Patricia Mason, Norma Ward, Geraldine D. Spaeter, Eytan Yammer, Jason Smith, Marc Ward, Jack Bradish. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Salvatore Tino, Jr., John Barton, Salvatore Tino, III, Jeffrey Tino, Joan E. Tino, Nina Fuller, Joseph Nicklo, Mellanie Chafe, Estate of Jeanmarie Wallendorf, Estate of Jennifer Tino, Christine Barton, Christopher Barton added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Salvatore Tino, Jr., John Barton, Salvatore Tino, III, Jeffrey Tino, Joan E. Tino, Nina Fuller, Joseph Nicklo, Mellanie Chafe, Estate of Jeanmarie Wallendorf, Estate of Jennifer Tino, Christine Barton, Christopher Barton. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Anthony Freidman-Ceraso, Aaron Straub, Daniel Huber, Kristen Druckenmiller, Stephanie Feher, Matthew Straub, Jonathan Straub, Edward Straub, Michael Straub, Kristyn Steiner-Martin, Stanley Straub, Pamela Schiele, Addison Freidman, Kaitlin Steiner-Keller, Estate of Louise Borzumato added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Anthony Freidman-Ceraso, Aaron Straub, Daniel Huber, Kristen Druckenmiller, Stephanie Feher, Matthew Straub, Jonathan Straub, Edward Straub, Michael Straub, Kristyn Steiner-Martin, Stanley Straub, Pamela Schiele, Addison Freidman, Kaitlin Steiner-Keller, Estate of Louise Borzumato. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Estate of George Eric Smith, Latricia Smith, Raymond Wood, Samuel Collazo, Carl Smith, Raymond A. Smith, Christine Jackson, Scott Wood, Tanya Warren, Estate of Timothy P. Soulas, Elania Smith-Wyle, Leonardo Collazo, Raymond Smith, Jr., Estate of Marion Thomas, Martin Smith, Estate of Deborah Sallad, Kevin Smith, Troia Johnson, Estate of Gail Smith, Diane Smith, Danielle Smith, Korry Smith, Tawanda Smith, Gabriella Rinehart, Barbara Hargrove added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Estate of George Eric Smith, Latricia Smith, Raymond Wood, Samuel Collazo, Carl Smith, Raymond A. Smith, Christine Jackson, Scott Wood, Tanya Warren, Estate of Timothy P. Soulas, Elania Smith-Wyle, Leonardo Collazo, Raymond Smith, Jr., Estate of Marion Thomas, Martin Smith, Estate of Deborah Sallad, Kevin Smith, Troia Johnson, Estate of Gail Smith, Diane Smith, Danielle Smith, Korry Smith, Tawanda Smith, Gabriella Rinehart, Barbara Hargrove. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Matt Sloan, Patricia Sloan, Sarah Funk, Ronald S. Sloan, Naomi-Ruth Shefi, Roy-Yetkutiel Shefi, Estate of Paul K. Sloan added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Matt Sloan, Patricia Sloan, Sarah Funk, Ronald S. Sloan, Naomi-Ruth Shefi, Roy-Yetkutiel Shefi, Estate of Paul K. Sloan. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Victor Santillan, Paul Schertzer, Brielle Saracini, Raymond Santillan, Kirsten Saracini, Ester Santillan, Ellen Schertzer, Expedito C. Santillan, Lori Brody added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Victor Santillan, Paul Schertzer, Brielle Saracini, Raymond Santillan, Kirsten Saracini, Ester Santillan, Ellen Schertzer, Expedito C. Santillan, Lori Brody. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners D.S., a minor, Frederick Soulas, Timothy P. Soulas, Jr., Stephen Soulas, Frederick Soulas, III, Matthew Soulas, Nicole Soulas added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by D.S., a minor, Frederick Soulas, Timothy P. Soulas, Jr., Stephen Soulas, Frederick Soulas, III, Matthew Soulas, Nicole Soulas. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Christopher Soulas, Dan Soulas added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Christopher Soulas, Dan Soulas. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Andrew J. Soulas added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Andrew J. Soulas. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Michelle Donlan added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Michelle Donlan. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-MDL-1570 (GBD)(SN). (dnh)
December 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Timothy B. Fleming. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Timothy B. Fleming, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Timothy B. Fleming. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Timothy B. Fleming. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Katherine Soulas. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Timothy B. Fleming to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; The caption on the pleading must list all parties in their entirety. Do not use et al in the caption of an initial pleading. All of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Katherine Soulas with party text 'as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF TIMOTHY P. SOULAS, Deceased'. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 12/24/2018. (dnh)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16074007)Document filed by Katherine Soulas. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Relatedness Statement, #4 Rule 7.1 Statement, #5 Summons)(Fleming, Timothy) Modified on 12/19/2018 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soulas v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Soulas
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Jeanmarie Wallendorf
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Soulas
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Korry Smith
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eytan Yammer
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Huber
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Collazo
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Paul K. Sloan
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Soulas
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brielle Saracini
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Timothy P. Soulas
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonardo Collazo
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Louise Borzumato
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Soulas
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Tino
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Jennifer Tino
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Nicklo
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Barton
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine D. Spaeter
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Sandra Wright-Cartledge
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Haines
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Smith
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Smith
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Jackson
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Barton
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Kramer
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi-Ruth Shefi
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawanda Smith
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.S., a minor
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristyn Steiner-Martin
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Funk
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Straub
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dian Dembinski
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan E. Tino
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond A. Smith
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Hargrove
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Soulas, III
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Smith
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Deborah Sallad
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christi Pendergraft
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Schiele
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Mason
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Straub
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Freidman-Ceraso
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Smith
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Schertzer
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Addison Freidman
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Santillan
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Bradish
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Druckenmiller
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Brody
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Ward
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Straub
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Expedito C. Santillan
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J. Soulas
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Fuller
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latricia Smith
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirsten Saracini
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Straub
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Soulas
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Ward
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Sloan
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Marion Thomas
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Straub
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy P. Soulas, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Wood
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald S. Sloan
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Smith
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Wood
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Donlan
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Barton
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Santillan
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troia Johnson
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Soulas
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Gail Smith
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Smith
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Warren
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriella Rinehart
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Schertzer
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy-Yetkutiel Shefi
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of George Eric Smith
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Ward
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ester Santillan
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mellanie Chafe
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bradish
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Sloan
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Soulas
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Feher
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Straub
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elania Smith-Wyle
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore Tino, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore Tino, III
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kaitlin Steiner-Keller
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mike Smith
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?