O'Sullivan et al v. Deutsche Bank AG et al.
Plaintiff: Christopher Bryant Anderson, A.M.M., Timothy O'Sullivan, Domenick Jared Alagna, K.A., Eric James Atkinson, Mary Louise Milton, T.A. 2, Todd Alldridge, Ronald Alldridge, Dianna Alldridge, Harold Allen Milton, Joann Alldridge, Travis Ryan Bass, Tahnee Anderson, Harold C Bass, Andrew Charles Major, Ashley Meikel Major, Brian Clark Alldridge, T.A. 1, Wilfredo Ramirez Castillo, Andrew Pearcy, Jonathan F. Kuniholm, Gregory Edward Hogancamp, Jacob Mills, Tina Louise Houchins, Sonja Ruhren, Estate of Robert P. Hartwick, Sharon Nichols, Jeff McKinley Wright, Daniel Bivens, Patrick Pearcy, James Nichols, Wyman Harrell Jones, Baltazar Morin Jr., Elizabeth Grace Williams, Alicia Mixson, Sara Margaret Kinnel-Frederick, Linda K. Hartwick, Martin Sicairos, Joseph William Greenalch, James Michael Ohrt, Jeanetta Dawn Bivens, James R. Nichols, Anne Pearcy, Heather Nicole Coe, Daniel Wayne Segers, Brad Lee Schwarz, Charles Wayland Griffiths Sr., Shirley Atkinson, Peggy O. Rutkoskie, Lisa Lambert, Thomas Niquette, Ioan Adrian Kelemen, Douglas Hamilton Kinard Jr., Brima Turay, Aaron Bass, Jessica Nolte, Virginia Breann Mixson, Michele Terese Quinn, Andrea Devin Simmons, Christine Cooley, C.D.R., Sean Lee Williams, Sue Ann Williams, Rosa Pratt, Crystal Hastings, Joseph Catlin Mixson, Teresita Sapitula Castillo, Koma Kekoa Texeira, Teray Anton Bundy, Joseph Johnson Mixson, Jr., Mark Howard Beyers, Brian Robert Schar, Siera Nicole Collins, Karyn McDonald, Estrella Sicairos, Roger Lee Young, Dennis Ward, Antonio Harold Ward, K.J.Y., Michael L. Owen, Walter Leman Thomas, John Boyle, Lauren Niquette, Susan Hinkhouse, M.J.F., Kevin Randall Smith, Kayleigh Ann Williams, Linda Ann Gress, Jayme Boyle, Bruce Kuniholm, Jay Myrle Fondren, Allison Poole Roosien, Robert A. Hartwick, Carol Boyle, Rene Gutel, James A. Gilbert, Larry Segers, Rodney Lewayne McBride, Thomas Milton Coe II, Robert James Pearson, Anita Nolte, Melida Collins, Nickolas Alan Williams, David Larry Segers, Denise Beyers, Melina Rose Nolte, T.B.H., Kelly Lynn Von Letkemann, Victoria Elena Phillippi, Tara Kathleen Hutchinson, Mildred Lue Smith, S.K., Haley Russell, John Maine, Hannah Hartwick, James Joseph Poole III, Michael Anthony Collins, Joshua Bradley Wolfe, Chad Hinkhouse, Arthur B. Stokenbury, Estate of Christopher Brook Fishbeck, Quentin D Collins, Randi Jean Martz, Terrence Alexis Elizenberry, Ernesto P. Hernandez III, Angela Konen, Kathey Comeletta Kidd, Travis Maccody Strong, Melvin Jerome Gatewood, Kayla Michelle Gulley, A.M.K. 2, Laird Pearcy, Anthony Joseph Durkacs, Daniel Gautier, Dylan Elijah Smith, Maria Luisa Castillo, George Lon Williams, Gary Douglas Fishbeck, Hilton Jerome Germany, Jr., Dalis Ward, Sean M. Niquette, Alexis Houchins, A.M.K. 1, K.A.H., William Robert Biggs, Miranda Arispe Harelston, Astra Carlisa Coleman, Ernesto I. Hernandez II, Jonathan Brock Hogge, Colin Laird Pearcy, Brandon Hinkhouse, R.O., Adam Christopher Bass, Thomas Nichols, L.D.R.S., David Christofer Boyle, Martin Sicairos Jr., Antonio Martinez Frederick, I.C.C., Tymon Larma Coleman, Ronald Lynn Gatewood, Jr., Randall Lavis Klingensmith, A.N., Joshua Mills, Evan Wayne Byler, Patricia Alexandria Gautier, Joshua Jonathon Cooley, Christian Phillips Rodriguez, Mark Joseph Pratt, Grant Blaney Von Letkemann, II, Erin Kuniholm, Michael James Bell, Guillermo Castillo, N.H., T.L.C., Joshua Lionel Holladay, Jody Striker, Ruth Turay, Tayler Heston, David Allen Simmons II, Sharon Wynona Parker, Loretta Lucille Young, Laurie Miller, Edna Fay Adams, Mary Niquette, Cathy Jean Mills, William M. Chinn, Ernesto Hernandez IV, Hardy Pierce Mills IV, Toni Kay Attanasio, Kade Luther Hinkhouse, Karon Mixson, Melissa C. Netznik, Elizabeth Kuniholm, Allen Ryan Vaught, Ana M. Gomez, Richard Hinkhouse, V.T.C., Queen Nichols, Jackay Lynn Smith, Laura Fay Hernandez, Jerrald J. Jensen, Shawn Christopher Alan Collins, Grant Ransom Blackwell, Anne Hollingsworth Fondren and Jo Ann Sicairos
Defendant: Royal Bank of Scotland Plc (n/k/a Natwest Markets Plc), New York Branch, Commerzbank AG, Credit Agricole Corporate & Investment Bank, New York Branch, BNP Paribas S.A., Commerzbank AG, New York Branch, Standard Chartered Bank, New York Branch, Credit Suisse AG, Bank Saderat PLC, Credit Agricole Corporate & Investment Bank, Barclays Bank Plc, New York Branch, BNP Paribas, S.A., New York Branch, Royal Bank of Scotland N.V., Credit Suisse AG, New York Branch, Deutsche Bank AG, New York Branch, Royal Bank of Scotland Plc (n/k/a Natwest Markets Plc), Credit Agricole S.A., HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Holdings PLC, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC Bank Plc, Standard Chartered Bank, Barclays Bank Plc, and HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv12325
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gabriel W Gorenstein
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Bank Saderat Plc. (km)
March 7, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIRMATION of Christopher G. Paulos in Support re: #19 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by A.M.K. 1, A.M.K. 2, A.M.M., A.N., Edna Fay Adams, Domenick Jared Alagna, Brian Clark Alldridge, Dianna Alldridge, Joann Alldridge, Ronald Alldridge, Todd Alldridge, Christopher Bryant Anderson, Tahnee Anderson, Eric James Atkinson, Shirley Atkinson, Toni Kay Attanasio, Aaron Bass, Adam Christopher Bass, Harold C Bass, Travis Ryan Bass, Michael James Bell, Denise Beyers, Mark Howard Beyers, William Robert Biggs, Daniel Bivens, Jeanetta Dawn Bivens, Grant Ransom Blackwell, Carol Boyle, David Christofer Boyle, Jayme Boyle, John Boyle, Teray Anton Bundy, Evan Wayne Byler, C.D.R., Guillermo Castillo, Maria Luisa Castillo, Teresita Sapitula Castillo, Wilfredo Ramirez Castillo, William M. Chinn, Heather Nicole Coe, Thomas Milton Coe II, Astra Carlisa Coleman, Tymon Larma Coleman, Melida Collins, Michael Anthony Collins, Quentin D Collins, Shawn Christopher Alan Collins, Siera Nicole Collins, Christine Cooley, Joshua Jonathon Cooley, Anthony Joseph Durkacs, Terrence Alexis Elizenberry, Estate of Christopher Brook Fishbeck, Gary Douglas Fishbeck, Anne Hollingsworth Fondren, Jay Myrle Fondren, Antonio Martinez Frederick, Melvin Jerome Gatewood, Ronald Lynn Gatewood, Jr., Daniel Gautier, Patricia Alexandria Gautier, Hilton Jerome Germany, Jr., James A. Gilbert, Ana M. Gomez, Joseph William Greenalch, Linda Ann Gress, Charles Wayland Griffiths Sr., Kayla Michelle Gulley, Rene Gutel, Miranda Arispe Harelston, Estate of Robert P. Hartwick, Hannah Hartwick, Linda K. Hartwick, Robert A. Hartwick, Crystal Hastings, Laura Fay Hernandez, Ernesto I. Hernandez II, Ernesto P. Hernandez III, Ernesto Hernandez IV, Tayler Heston, Brandon Hinkhouse, Chad Hinkhouse, Kade Luther Hinkhouse, Richard Hinkhouse, Susan Hinkhouse, Gregory Edward Hogancamp, Jonathan Brock Hogge, Joshua Lionel Holladay, Alexis Houchins, Tina Louise Houchins, Tara Kathleen Hutchinson, I.C.C., Jerrald J. Jensen, Wyman Harrell Jones, K.A., K.A.H., K.J.Y., Ioan Adrian Kelemen, Kathey Comeletta Kidd, Douglas Hamilton Kinard Jr., Sara Margaret Kinnel-Frederick, Randall Lavis Klingensmith, Angela Konen, Bruce Kuniholm, Elizabeth Kuniholm, Erin Kuniholm, Jonathan F. Kuniholm, L.D.R.S., Lisa Lambert, M.J.F., John Maine, Andrew Charles Major, Ashley Meikel Major, Randi Jean Martz, Rodney Lewayne McBride, Karyn McDonald, Melina Rose Nolte, Laurie Miller, Cathy Jean Mills, Jacob Mills, Joshua Mills, Hardy Pierce Mills IV, Harold Allen Milton, Mary Louise Milton, Alicia Mixson, Joseph Catlin Mixson, Karon Mixson, Virginia Breann Mixson, Joseph Johnson Mixson, Jr., Baltazar Morin Jr., N.H., Melissa C. Netznik, James Nichols, James R. Nichols, Queen Nichols, Sharon Nichols, Thomas Nichols, Lauren Niquette, Mary Niquette, Sean M. Niquette, Thomas Niquette, Anita Nolte, Jessica Nolte, Melina Rose Nolte, Timothy O'Sullivan, James Michael Ohrt, Michael L. Owen, Sharon Wynona Parker, Andrew Pearcy, Anne Pearcy, Colin Laird Pearcy, Laird Pearcy, Patrick Pearcy, Robert James Pearson, Victoria Elena Phillippi, James Joseph Poole III, Mark Joseph Pratt, Rosa Pratt, Michele Terese Quinn, R.O., Christian Phillips Rodriguez, Allison Poole Roosien, Sonja Ruhren, Haley Russell, Peggy O. Rutkoskie, S.K., Brian Robert Schar, Brad Lee Schwarz, Daniel Wayne Segers, David Larry Segers, Larry Segers, Estrella Sicairos, Jo Ann Sicairos, Martin Sicairos, Martin Sicairos Jr., Andrea Devin Simmons, David Allen Simmons II, Dylan Elijah Smith, Jackay Lynn Smith, Kevin Randall Smith, Mildred Lue Smith, Sonja Ruhren, Arthur B. Stokenbury, Jody Striker, Travis Maccody Strong, T.A. 1, T.A. 2, T.B.H., T.L.C., Koma Kekoa Texeira, Walter Leman Thomas, Tina Louise Houchins, Brima Turay, Ruth Turay, V.T.C., Allen Ryan Vaught, Grant Blaney Von Letkemann, II, Kelly Lynn Von Letkemann, Antonio Harold Ward, Dalis Ward, Dennis Ward, Elizabeth Grace Williams, George Lon Williams, Kayleigh Ann Williams, Nickolas Alan Williams, Sean Lee Williams, Sue Ann Williams, Joshua Bradley Wolfe, Jeff McKinley Wright, Loretta Lucille Young, Roger Lee Young. (Paulos, Christopher)
March 7, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by A.M.K. 1, A.M.K. 2, A.M.M., A.N., Edna Fay Adams, Domenick Jared Alagna, Brian Clark Alldridge, Dianna Alldridge, Joann Alldridge, Ronald Alldridge, Todd Alldridge, Christopher Bryant Anderson, Tahnee Anderson, Eric James Atkinson, Shirley Atkinson, Toni Kay Attanasio, Aaron Bass, Adam Christopher Bass, Harold C Bass, Travis Ryan Bass, Michael James Bell, Denise Beyers, Mark Howard Beyers, William Robert Biggs, Daniel Bivens, Jeanetta Dawn Bivens, Grant Ransom Blackwell, Carol Boyle, David Christofer Boyle, Jayme Boyle, John Boyle, Teray Anton Bundy, Evan Wayne Byler, C.D.R., Guillermo Castillo, Maria Luisa Castillo, Teresita Sapitula Castillo, Wilfredo Ramirez Castillo, William M. Chinn, Heather Nicole Coe, Thomas Milton Coe II, Astra Carlisa Coleman, Tymon Larma Coleman, Melida Collins, Michael Anthony Collins, Quentin D Collins, Shawn Christopher Alan Collins, Siera Nicole Collins, Christine Cooley, Joshua Jonathon Cooley, Anthony Joseph Durkacs, Terrence Alexis Elizenberry, Estate of Christopher Brook Fishbeck, Gary Douglas Fishbeck, Anne Hollingsworth Fondren, Jay Myrle Fondren, Antonio Martinez Frederick, Melvin Jerome Gatewood, Ronald Lynn Gatewood, Jr., Daniel Gautier, Patricia Alexandria Gautier, Hilton Jerome Germany, Jr., James A. Gilbert, Ana M. Gomez, Joseph William Greenalch, Linda Ann Gress, Charles Wayland Griffiths Sr., Kayla Michelle Gulley, Rene Gutel, Miranda Arispe Harelston, Estate of Robert P. Hartwick, Hannah Hartwick, Linda K. Hartwick, Robert A. Hartwick, Crystal Hastings, Laura Fay Hernandez, Ernesto I. Hernandez II, Ernesto P. Hernandez III, Ernesto Hernandez IV, Tayler Heston, Brandon Hinkhouse, Chad Hinkhouse, Kade Luther Hinkhouse, Richard Hinkhouse, Susan Hinkhouse, Gregory Edward Hogancamp, Jonathan Brock Hogge, Joshua Lionel Holladay, Alexis Houchins, Tina Louise Houchins, Tara Kathleen Hutchinson, I.C.C., Jerrald J. Jensen, Wyman Harrell Jones, K.A., K.A.H., K.J.Y., Ioan Adrian Kelemen, Kathey Comeletta Kidd, Douglas Hamilton Kinard Jr., Sara Margaret Kinnel-Frederick, Randall Lavis Klingensmith, Angela Konen, Bruce Kuniholm, Elizabeth Kuniholm, Erin Kuniholm, Jonathan F. Kuniholm, L.D.R.S., Lisa Lambert, M.J.F., John Maine, Andrew Charles Major, Ashley Meikel Major, Randi Jean Martz, Rodney Lewayne McBride, Karyn McDonald, Melina Rose Nolte, Laurie Miller, Cathy Jean Mills, Jacob Mills, Joshua Mills, Hardy Pierce Mills IV, Harold Allen Milton, Mary Louise Milton, Alicia Mixson, Joseph Catlin Mixson, Karon Mixson, Virginia Breann Mixson, Joseph Johnson Mixson, Jr., Baltazar Morin Jr., N.H., Melissa C. Netznik, James Nichols, James R. Nichols, Queen Nichols, Sharon Nichols, Thomas Nichols, Lauren Niquette, Mary Niquette, Sean M. Niquette, Thomas Niquette, Anita Nolte, Jessica Nolte, Melina Rose Nolte, Timothy O'Sullivan, James Michael Ohrt, Michael L. Owen, Sharon Wynona Parker, Andrew Pearcy, Anne Pearcy, Colin Laird Pearcy, Laird Pearcy, Patrick Pearcy, Robert James Pearson, Victoria Elena Phillippi, James Joseph Poole III, Mark Joseph Pratt, Rosa Pratt, Michele Terese Quinn, R.O., Christian Phillips Rodriguez, Allison Poole Roosien, Sonja Ruhren, Haley Russell, Peggy O. Rutkoskie, S.K., Brian Robert Schar, Brad Lee Schwarz, Daniel Wayne Segers, David Larry Segers, Larry Segers, Estrella Sicairos, Jo Ann Sicairos, Martin Sicairos, Martin Sicairos Jr., Andrea Devin Simmons, David Allen Simmons II, Dylan Elijah Smith, Jackay Lynn Smith, Kevin Randall Smith, Mildred Lue Smith, Sonja Ruhren, Arthur B. Stokenbury, Jody Striker, Travis Maccody Strong, T.A. 1, T.A. 2, T.B.H., T.L.C., Koma Kekoa Texeira, Walter Leman Thomas, Tina Louise Houchins, Brima Turay, Ruth Turay, V.T.C., Allen Ryan Vaught, Grant Blaney Von Letkemann, II, Kelly Lynn Von Letkemann, Antonio Harold Ward, Dalis Ward, Dennis Ward, Elizabeth Grace Williams, George Lon Williams, Kayleigh Ann Williams, Nickolas Alan Williams, Sean Lee Williams, Sue Ann Williams, Joshua Bradley Wolfe, Jeff McKinley Wright, Loretta Lucille Young, Roger Lee Young. (Paulos, Christopher) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
February 14, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Bank Saderat PLC served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. Service was accepted by Samantha Vieitez, Head of HR and Administration for Bank Saderat Plc. Document filed by David Allen Simmons II; Denise Beyers; Jo Ann Sicairos; Laura Fay Hernandez; Brima Turay; Baltazar Morin Jr.; David Larry Segers; Sean Lee Williams; Wyman Harrell Jones; Melvin Jerome Gatewood; Harold C Bass; Richard Hinkhouse; Heather Nicole Coe; Eric James Atkinson; Rosa Pratt; Joshua Bradley Wolfe; Shawn Christopher Alan Collins; Wilfredo Ramirez Castillo; Dalis Ward; Jayme Boyle; V.T.C.; Travis Maccody Strong; Martin Sicairos Jr.; Karon Mixson; Harold Allen Milton; Thomas Milton Coe II; Christopher Bryant Anderson; Ioan Adrian Kelemen; Miranda Arispe Harelston; Toni Kay Attanasio; Angela Konen; Bruce Kuniholm; Jessica Nolte; Joshua Lionel Holladay; Elizabeth Kuniholm; Carol Boyle; Sharon Nichols; Hardy Pierce Mills IV; C.D.R.; K.A.; Andrea Devin Simmons; Lisa Lambert; Kelly Lynn Von Letkemann; Melina Rose Nolte; Brandon Hinkhouse; Ernesto I. Hernandez II; Ernesto Hernandez IV; Linda K. Hartwick; Allen Ryan Vaught; A.N.; Domenick Jared Alagna; Travis Ryan Bass; Larry Segers; Jeanetta Dawn Bivens; Joseph William Greenalch; Jay Myrle Fondren; Mark Joseph Pratt; K.J.Y.; Sean M. Niquette; Kayleigh Ann Williams; S.K.; Estate of Robert P. Hartwick; Maria Luisa Castillo; T.A. 2; Jody Striker; Antonio Harold Ward; Alexis Houchins; T.L.C.; Laird Pearcy; A.M.K. 2; William Robert Biggs; Grant Ransom Blackwell; Loretta Lucille Young; Teresita Sapitula Castillo; Mildred Lue Smith; Michael James Bell; Jonathan F. Kuniholm; Thomas Niquette; Patricia Alexandria Gautier; Peggy O. Rutkoskie; Nickolas Alan Williams; Daniel Gautier; Ana M. Gomez; Roger Lee Young; Cathy Jean Mills; L.D.R.S.; A.M.K. 1; Anne Hollingsworth Fondren; Susan Hinkhouse; Melida Collins; Ernesto P. Hernandez III; Ronald Alldridge; Grant Blaney Von Letkemann, II; Dennis Ward; Thomas Nichols; Ruth Turay; Adam Christopher Bass; Andrew Charles Major; Christian Phillips Rodriguez; A.M.M.; Estrella Sicairos; Erin Kuniholm; Gregory Edward Hogancamp; Jackay Lynn Smith; Michael Anthony Collins; Queen Nichols; James A. Gilbert; Sara Margaret Kinnel-Frederick; Randall Lavis Klingensmith; Patrick Pearcy; Mark Howard Beyers; Daniel Bivens; Virginia Breann Mixson; Astra Carlisa Coleman; Kevin Randall Smith; Jeff McKinley Wright; Gary Douglas Fishbeck; Elizabeth Grace Williams; Tina Louise Houchins; Hilton Jerome Germany, Jr.; Jonathan Brock Hogge; Todd Alldridge; David Christofer Boyle; Michael L. Owen; Rene Gutel; John Maine; R.O.; Laurie Miller; James Nichols; Martin Sicairos; Jacob Mills; Rodney Lewayne McBride; Karyn McDonald; Brad Lee Schwarz; Tymon Larma Coleman; Teray Anton Bundy; Kade Luther Hinkhouse; Allison Poole Roosien; Tahnee Anderson; Michele Terese Quinn; James Joseph Poole III; Andrew Pearcy; Antonio Martinez Frederick; K.A.H.; M.J.F.; Victoria Elena Phillippi; Kayla Michelle Gulley; Mary Louise Milton; Anita Nolte; Ronald Lynn Gatewood, Jr.; Haley Russell; Estate of Christopher Brook Fishbeck; Linda Ann Gress; T.B.H.; James Michael Ohrt; Kathey Comeletta Kidd; Terrence Alexis Elizenberry; Timothy O'Sullivan; Chad Hinkhouse; Joseph Johnson Mixson, Jr.; Siera Nicole Collins; Aaron Bass; Joseph Catlin Mixson; Sue Ann Williams; Sharon Wynona Parker; George Lon Williams; I.C.C.; William M. Chinn; John Boyle; Guillermo Castillo; Sonja Ruhren; N.H.; Tayler Heston; Tara Kathleen Hutchinson; Walter Leman Thomas; Evan Wayne Byler; Shirley Atkinson; Joshua Jonathon Cooley; Edna Fay Adams; Randi Jean Martz; Douglas Hamilton Kinard Jr.; Alicia Mixson; Tina Louise Houchins; Christine Cooley; Melissa C. Netznik; Jerrald J. Jensen; Hannah Hartwick; Daniel Wayne Segers; Robert A. Hartwick; Melina Rose Nolte; Crystal Hastings; Arthur B. Stokenbury; Charles Wayland Griffiths Sr.; T.A. 1; Ashley Meikel Major; Brian Clark Alldridge; Dylan Elijah Smith; Colin Laird Pearcy; Lauren Niquette; James R. Nichols; Quentin D Collins; Dianna Alldridge; Sonja Ruhren; Joshua Mills; Anne Pearcy; Joann Alldridge; Anthony Joseph Durkacs; Brian Robert Schar; Mary Niquette; Robert James Pearson; Koma Kekoa Texeira. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hague Certificate Attestation and Proof of Service)(Paulos, Christopher)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #8 Motion for Christopher C. Dyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 1/31/2019) (ama)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #12 Motion for James L Magazine to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 1/31/2019) (ama)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #10 Motion for Christopher G. Paulos to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 1/31/2019) (ama)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 Motion for W. Troy Bouk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 1/31/2019) (ama)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (188 in 1:17-cv-08709-LTS-GWG) Letter, filed by HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, Credit Suisse AG, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC North America Holdings Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Please file new letter request in the event this occurs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 1/30/2019) (ama)
January 31, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for James L Magazine to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16272736. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for James L Magazine to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16272736. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by A.M.K. 1, A.M.K. 2, A.M.M., A.N., Edna Fay Adams, Domenick Jared Alagna, Brian Clark Alldridge, Dianna Alldridge, Joann Alldridge, Ronald Alldridge, Todd Alldridge, Christopher Bryant Anderson, Tahnee Anderson, Eric James Atkinson, Shirley Atkinson, Toni Kay Attanasio, Aaron Bass, Adam Christopher Bass, Harold C Bass, Travis Ryan Bass, Michael James Bell, Denise Beyers, Mark Howard Beyers, William Robert Biggs, Daniel Bivens, Jeanetta Dawn Bivens, Grant Ransom Blackwell, Carol Boyle, David Christofer Boyle, Jayme Boyle, John Boyle, Teray Anton Bundy, Evan Wayne Byler, C.D.R., Guillermo Castillo, Maria Luisa Castillo, Teresita Sapitula Castillo, Wilfredo Ramirez Castillo, William M. Chinn, Heather Nicole Coe, Thomas Milton Coe II, Astra Carlisa Coleman, Tymon Larma Coleman, Melida Collins, Michael Anthony Collins, Quentin D Collins, Shawn Christopher Alan Collins, Siera Nicole Collins, Christine Cooley, Joshua Jonathon Cooley, Anthony Joseph Durkacs, Terrence Alexis Elizenberry, Estate of Christopher Brook Fishbeck, Gary Douglas Fishbeck, Anne Hollingsworth Fondren, Jay Myrle Fondren, Antonio Martinez Frederick, Melvin Jerome Gatewood, Ronald Lynn Gatewood, Jr., Daniel Gautier, Patricia Alexandria Gautier, Hilton Jerome Germany, Jr., James A. Gilbert, Ana M. Gomez, Joseph William Greenalch, Linda Ann Gress, Charles Wayland Griffiths Sr., Kayla Michelle Gulley, Rene Gutel, Miranda Arispe Harelston, Estate of Robert P. Hartwick, Hannah Hartwick, Linda K. Hartwick, Robert A. Hartwick, Crystal Hastings, Laura Fay Hernandez, Ernesto I. Hernandez II, Ernesto P. Hernandez III, Ernesto Hernandez IV, Tayler Heston, Brandon Hinkhouse, Chad Hinkhouse, Kade Luther Hinkhouse, Richard Hinkhouse, Susan Hinkhouse, Gregory Edward Hogancamp, Jonathan Brock Hogge, Joshua Lionel Holladay, Alexis Houchins, Tina Louise Houchins, Tara Kathleen Hutchinson, I.C.C., Jerrald J. Jensen, Wyman Harrell Jones, K.A., K.A.H., K.J.Y., Ioan Adrian Kelemen, Kathey Comeletta Kidd, Douglas Hamilton Kinard Jr., Sara Margaret Kinnel-Frederick, Randall Lavis Klingensmith, Angela Konen, Bruce Kuniholm, Elizabeth Kuniholm, Erin Kuniholm, Jonathan F. Kuniholm, L.D.R.S., Lisa Lambert, M.J.F., John Maine, Andrew Charles Major, Ashley Meikel Major, Randi Jean Martz, Rodney Lewayne McBride, Karyn McDonald, Melina Rose Nolte, Laurie Miller, Cathy Jean Mills, Jacob Mills, Joshua Mills, Hardy Pierce Mills IV, Harold Allen Milton, Mary Louise Milton, Alicia Mixson, Joseph Catlin Mixson, Karon Mixson, Virginia Breann Mixson, Joseph Johnson Mixson, Jr., Baltazar Morin Jr., N.H., Melissa C. Netznik, James Nichols, James R. Nichols, Queen Nichols, Sharon Nichols, Thomas Nichols, Lauren Niquette, Mary Niquette, Sean M. Niquette, Thomas Niquette, Anita Nolte, Jessica Nolte, Melina Rose Nolte, Timothy O'Sullivan, James Michael Ohrt, Michael L. Owen, Sharon Wynona Parker, Andrew Pearcy, Anne Pearcy, Colin Laird Pearcy, Laird Pearcy, Patrick Pearcy, Robert James Pearson, Victoria Elena Phillippi, James Joseph Poole III, Mark Joseph Pratt, Rosa Pratt, Michele Terese Quinn, R.O., Christian Phillips Rodriguez, Allison Poole Roosien, Sonja Ruhren, Haley Russell, Peggy O. Rutkoskie, S.K., Brian Robert Schar, Brad Lee Schwarz, Daniel Wayne Segers, David Larry Segers, Larry Segers, Estrella Sicairos, Jo Ann Sicairos, Martin Sicairos, Martin Sicairos Jr., Andrea Devin Simmons, David Allen Simmons II, Dylan Elijah Smith, Jackay Lynn Smith, Kevin Randall Smith, Mildred Lue Smith, Sonja Ruhren, Arthur B. Stokenbury, Jody Striker, Travis Maccody Strong, T.A. 1, T.A. 2, T.B.H., T.L.C., Koma Kekoa Texeira, Walter Leman Thomas, Tina Louise Houchins, Brima Turay, Ruth Turay, V.T.C., Allen Ryan Vaught, Grant Blaney Von Letkemann, II, Kelly Lynn Von Letkemann, Antonio Harold Ward, Dalis Ward, Dennis Ward, Elizabeth Grace Williams, George Lon Williams, Kayleigh Ann Williams, Nickolas Alan Williams, Sean Lee Williams, Sue Ann Williams, Joshua Bradley Wolfe, Jeff McKinley Wright, Loretta Lucille Young, Roger Lee Young. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Magazine, James)
January 30, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for W. Troy Bouk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16268661. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #10 MOTION for Christopher G. Paulos to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16268368. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for W. Troy Bouk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16268661. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by A.M.K. 1, A.M.K. 2, A.M.M., A.N., Edna Fay Adams, Domenick Jared Alagna, Brian Clark Alldridge, Dianna Alldridge, Joann Alldridge, Ronald Alldridge, Todd Alldridge, Christopher Bryant Anderson, Tahnee Anderson, Eric James Atkinson, Shirley Atkinson, Toni Kay Attanasio, Aaron Bass, Adam Christopher Bass, Harold C Bass, Travis Ryan Bass, Michael James Bell, Denise Beyers, Mark Howard Beyers, William Robert Biggs, Daniel Bivens, Jeanetta Dawn Bivens, Grant Ransom Blackwell, Carol Boyle, David Christofer Boyle, Jayme Boyle, John Boyle, Teray Anton Bundy, Evan Wayne Byler, C.D.R., Guillermo Castillo, Maria Luisa Castillo, Teresita Sapitula Castillo, Wilfredo Ramirez Castillo, William M. Chinn, Heather Nicole Coe, Thomas Milton Coe II, Astra Carlisa Coleman, Tymon Larma Coleman, Melida Collins, Michael Anthony Collins, Quentin D Collins, Shawn Christopher Alan Collins, Siera Nicole Collins, Christine Cooley, Joshua Jonathon Cooley, Anthony Joseph Durkacs, Terrence Alexis Elizenberry, Estate of Christopher Brook Fishbeck, Gary Douglas Fishbeck, Anne Hollingsworth Fondren, Jay Myrle Fondren, Antonio Martinez Frederick, Melvin Jerome Gatewood, Ronald Lynn Gatewood, Jr., Daniel Gautier, Patricia Alexandria Gautier, Hilton Jerome Germany, Jr., James A. Gilbert, Ana M. Gomez, Joseph William Greenalch, Linda Ann Gress, Charles Wayland Griffiths Sr., Kayla Michelle Gulley, Rene Gutel, Miranda Arispe Harelston, Estate of Robert P. Hartwick, Hannah Hartwick, Linda K. Hartwick, Robert A. Hartwick, Crystal Hastings, Laura Fay Hernandez, Ernesto I. Hernandez II, Ernesto P. Hernandez III, Ernesto Hernandez IV, Tayler Heston, Brandon Hinkhouse, Chad Hinkhouse, Kade Luther Hinkhouse, Richard Hinkhouse, Susan Hinkhouse, Gregory Edward Hogancamp, Jonathan Brock Hogge, Joshua Lionel Holladay, Alexis Houchins, Tina Louise Houchins, Tara Kathleen Hutchinson, I.C.C., Jerrald J. Jensen, Wyman Harrell Jones, K.A., K.A.H., K.J.Y., Ioan Adrian Kelemen, Kathey Comeletta Kidd, Douglas Hamilton Kinard Jr., Sara Margaret Kinnel-Frederick, Randall Lavis Klingensmith, Angela Konen, Bruce Kuniholm, Elizabeth Kuniholm, Erin Kuniholm, Jonathan F. Kuniholm, L.D.R.S., Lisa Lambert, M.J.F., John Maine, Andrew Charles Major, Ashley Meikel Major, Randi Jean Martz, Rodney Lewayne McBride, Karyn McDonald, Melina Rose Nolte, Laurie Miller, Cathy Jean Mills, Jacob Mills, Joshua Mills, Hardy Pierce Mills IV, Harold Allen Milton, Mary Louise Milton, Alicia Mixson, Joseph Catlin Mixson, Karon Mixson, Virginia Breann Mixson, Joseph Johnson Mixson, Jr., Baltazar Morin Jr., N.H., Melissa C. Netznik, James Nichols, James R. Nichols, Queen Nichols, Sharon Nichols, Thomas Nichols, Lauren Niquette, Mary Niquette, Sean M. Niquette, Thomas Niquette, Anita Nolte, Jessica Nolte, Melina Rose Nolte, Timothy O'Sullivan, James Michael Ohrt, Michael L. Owen, Sharon Wynona Parker, Andrew Pearcy, Anne Pearcy, Colin Laird Pearcy, Laird Pearcy, Patrick Pearcy, Robert James Pearson, Victoria Elena Phillippi, James Joseph Poole III, Mark Joseph Pratt, Rosa Pratt, Michele Terese Quinn, R.O., Christian Phillips Rodriguez, Allison Poole Roosien, Sonja Ruhren, Haley Russell, Peggy O. Rutkoskie, S.K., Brian Robert Schar, Brad Lee Schwarz, Daniel Wayne Segers, David Larry Segers, Larry Segers, Estrella Sicairos, Jo Ann Sicairos, Martin Sicairos, Martin Sicairos Jr., Andrea Devin Simmons, David Allen Simmons II, Dylan Elijah Smith, Jackay Lynn Smith, Sonja Ruhren, Arthur B. Stokenbury, Jody Striker, Travis Maccody Strong, T.A. 1, T.A. 2, T.B.H., T.L.C., Koma Kekoa Texeira, Walter Leman Thomas, Tina Louise Houchins, Brima Turay, Ruth Turay, V.T.C., Allen Ryan Vaught, Grant Blaney Von Letkemann, II, Kelly Lynn Von Letkemann, Antonio Harold Ward, Dalis Ward, Dennis Ward, Elizabeth Grace Williams, George Lon Williams, Kayleigh Ann Williams, Nickolas Alan Williams, Sean Lee Williams, Sue Ann Williams, Joshua Bradley Wolfe, Jeff McKinley Wright, Loretta Lucille Young, Roger Lee Young. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit For Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bouk, Winston)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Christopher G. Paulos to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16268368. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by A.M.K. 1, A.M.K. 2, A.M.M., A.N., Edna Fay Adams, Domenick Jared Alagna, Brian Clark Alldridge, Dianna Alldridge, Joann Alldridge, Ronald Alldridge, Todd Alldridge, Christopher Bryant Anderson, Tahnee Anderson, Eric James Atkinson, Shirley Atkinson, Toni Kay Attanasio, Aaron Bass, Adam Christopher Bass, Harold C Bass, Travis Ryan Bass, Michael James Bell, Denise Beyers, Mark Howard Beyers, William Robert Biggs, Daniel Bivens, Jeanetta Dawn Bivens, Grant Ransom Blackwell, Carol Boyle, David Christofer Boyle, Jayme Boyle, John Boyle, Teray Anton Bundy, Evan Wayne Byler, C.D.R., Guillermo Castillo, Maria Luisa Castillo, Teresita Sapitula Castillo, Wilfredo Ramirez Castillo, William M. Chinn, Heather Nicole Coe, Thomas Milton Coe II, Astra Carlisa Coleman, Tymon Larma Coleman, Melida Collins, Michael Anthony Collins, Quentin D Collins, Shawn Christopher Alan Collins, Siera Nicole Collins, Christine Cooley, Joshua Jonathon Cooley, Anthony Joseph Durkacs, Terrence Alexis Elizenberry, Estate of Christopher Brook Fishbeck, Gary Douglas Fishbeck, Anne Hollingsworth Fondren, Jay Myrle Fondren, Antonio Martinez Frederick, Melvin Jerome Gatewood, Ronald Lynn Gatewood, Jr., Daniel Gautier, Patricia Alexandria Gautier, Hilton Jerome Germany, Jr., James A. Gilbert, Ana M. Gomez, Joseph William Greenalch, Linda Ann Gress, Charles Wayland Griffiths Sr., Kayla Michelle Gulley, Rene Gutel, Miranda Arispe Harelston, Estate of Robert P. Hartwick, Hannah Hartwick, Linda K. Hartwick, Robert A. Hartwick, Crystal Hastings, Laura Fay Hernandez, Ernesto I. Hernandez II, Ernesto P. Hernandez III, Ernesto Hernandez IV, Tayler Heston, Brandon Hinkhouse, Chad Hinkhouse, Kade Luther Hinkhouse, Richard Hinkhouse, Susan Hinkhouse, Gregory Edward Hogancamp, Jonathan Brock Hogge, Joshua Lionel Holladay, Alexis Houchins, Tina Louise Houchins, Tara Kathleen Hutchinson, I.C.C., Jerrald J. Jensen, Wyman Harrell Jones, K.A., K.A.H., K.J.Y., Ioan Adrian Kelemen, Kathey Comeletta Kidd, Douglas Hamilton Kinard Jr., Sara Margaret Kinnel-Frederick, Randall Lavis Klingensmith, Angela Konen, Bruce Kuniholm, Elizabeth Kuniholm, Erin Kuniholm, Jonathan F. Kuniholm, L.D.R.S., Lisa Lambert, M.J.F., John Maine, Andrew Charles Major, Ashley Meikel Major, Randi Jean Martz, Rodney Lewayne McBride, Karyn McDonald, Melina Rose Nolte, Laurie Miller, Cathy Jean Mills, Jacob Mills, Joshua Mills, Hardy Pierce Mills IV, Harold Allen Milton, Mary Louise Milton, Alicia Mixson, Joseph Catlin Mixson, Karon Mixson, Virginia Breann Mixson, Joseph Johnson Mixson, Jr., Baltazar Morin Jr., N.H., Melissa C. Netznik, James Nichols, James R. Nichols, Queen Nichols, Sharon Nichols, Thomas Nichols, Lauren Niquette, Mary Niquette, Sean M. Niquette, Thomas Niquette, Anita Nolte, Jessica Nolte, Melina Rose Nolte, Timothy O'Sullivan, James Michael Ohrt, Michael L. Owen, Sharon Wynona Parker, Andrew Pearcy, Anne Pearcy, Colin Laird Pearcy, Laird Pearcy, Patrick Pearcy, Robert James Pearson, Victoria Elena Phillippi, James Joseph Poole III, Mark Joseph Pratt, Rosa Pratt, Michele Terese Quinn, R.O., Christian Phillips Rodriguez, Allison Poole Roosien, Sonja Ruhren, Haley Russell, Peggy O. Rutkoskie, S.K., Brian Robert Schar, Brad Lee Schwarz, Daniel Wayne Segers, David Larry Segers, Larry Segers, Estrella Sicairos, Jo Ann Sicairos, Martin Sicairos, Martin Sicairos Jr., Andrea Devin Simmons, David Allen Simmons II, Dylan Elijah Smith, Jackay Lynn Smith, Kevin Randall Smith, Mildred Lue Smith, Sonja Ruhren, Arthur B. Stokenbury, Jody Striker, Travis Maccody Strong, T.A. 1, T.A. 2, T.B.H., T.L.C., Koma Kekoa Texeira, Walter Leman Thomas, Tina Louise Houchins, Brima Turay, Ruth Turay, V.T.C., Allen Ryan Vaught, Grant Blaney Von Letkemann, II, Kelly Lynn Von Letkemann, Antonio Harold Ward, Dalis Ward, Dennis Ward, Elizabeth Grace Williams, George Lon Williams, Kayleigh Ann Williams, Nickolas Alan Williams, Sean Lee Williams, Sue Ann Williams, Joshua Bradley Wolfe, Jeff McKinley Wright, Loretta Lucille Young, Roger Lee Young. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit For Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - FL, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - CA, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Paulos, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED BY AND BETWEEN the undersigned counsel as follows: 1. The undersigned parties agree that proceedings in O'Sullivan II, including service of the Complaint, related only to Moving Defendants and Defendant CASA, should be stayed until 30 days after the Court rules on the Motion to Dismiss in O'Sullivan I. 2. The Moving Defendants agree that upon termination of the stay, service on the Moving Defendants with judicial process in O'Sullivan II in the manner provided by Federal Ruleof Civil Procedure 4 will not be required. 3. The Moving Defendants retain all defenses and objections in O'Sullivan II, except for defenses and objections based on a defect in the summons or in the service of the summons in O'Sullivan II. The defenses and objections that the Moving Defendants hereby retain include, but are not limited to, defenses and objections related to (i) personal jurisdiction and (ii) whether offices that are not separately incorporated juridical entities have been properly named as defendants. 4. Following any ruling on the Motion to Dismiss in O'Sullivan I, the parties will confer in good faith regarding the most fair and efficient way to proceed in light of such ruling, with all parties' rights in this regard fully reserved. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED BY AND BETWEEN the undersigned counsel that except as provided above, nothing in this stipulation shall waive any right or defense of any party, all of which rights and defenses are expressly reserved. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 1/30/2019) (ama)
January 30, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Christopher C Dyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16266953. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Christopher C Dyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16266953. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by A.M.K. 1, A.M.K. 2, A.M.M., A.N., Edna Fay Adams, Domenick Jared Alagna, Brian Clark Alldridge, Dianna Alldridge, Joann Alldridge, Ronald Alldridge, Todd Alldridge, Christopher Bryant Anderson, Tahnee Anderson, Eric James Atkinson, Shirley Atkinson, Toni Kay Attanasio, Aaron Bass, Adam Christopher Bass, Harold C Bass, Travis Ryan Bass, Michael James Bell, Denise Beyers, Mark Howard Beyers, William Robert Biggs, Daniel Bivens, Jeanetta Dawn Bivens, Grant Ransom Blackwell, Carol Boyle, David Christofer Boyle, Jayme Boyle, John Boyle, Teray Anton Bundy, Evan Wayne Byler, C.D.R., Guillermo Castillo, Maria Luisa Castillo, Teresita Sapitula Castillo, Wilfredo Ramirez Castillo, William M. Chinn, Heather Nicole Coe, Thomas Milton Coe II, Astra Carlisa Coleman, Tymon Larma Coleman, Melida Collins, Michael Anthony Collins, Quentin D Collins, Shawn Christopher Alan Collins, Siera Nicole Collins, Christine Cooley, Joshua Jonathon Cooley, Anthony Joseph Durkacs, Terrence Alexis Elizenberry, Estate of Christopher Brook Fishbeck, Gary Douglas Fishbeck, Anne Hollingsworth Fondren, Jay Myrle Fondren, Antonio Martinez Frederick, Melvin Jerome Gatewood, Ronald Lynn Gatewood, Jr., Daniel Gautier, Patricia Alexandria Gautier, Hilton Jerome Germany, Jr., James A. Gilbert, Ana M. Gomez, Joseph William Greenalch, Linda Ann Gress, Charles Wayland Griffiths Sr., Kayla Michelle Gulley, Rene Gutel, Miranda Arispe Harelston, Estate of Robert P. Hartwick, Hannah Hartwick, Linda K. Hartwick, Robert A. Hartwick, Crystal Hastings, Laura Fay Hernandez, Ernesto I. Hernandez II, Ernesto P. Hernandez III, Ernesto Hernandez IV, Tayler Heston, Brandon Hinkhouse, Chad Hinkhouse, Kade Luther Hinkhouse, Richard Hinkhouse, Susan Hinkhouse, Gregory Edward Hogancamp, Jonathan Brock Hogge, Joshua Lionel Holladay, Alexis Houchins, Tina Louise Houchins, Tara Kathleen Hutchinson, I.C.C., Jerrald J. Jensen, Wyman Harrell Jones, K.A., K.A.H., K.J.Y., Ioan Adrian Kelemen, Kathey Comeletta Kidd, Douglas Hamilton Kinard Jr., Sara Margaret Kinnel-Frederick, Randall Lavis Klingensmith, Angela Konen, Bruce Kuniholm, Elizabeth Kuniholm, Erin Kuniholm, Jonathan F. Kuniholm, L.D.R.S., Lisa Lambert, M.J.F., John Maine, Andrew Charles Major, Ashley Meikel Major, Randi Jean Martz, Rodney Lewayne McBride, Karyn McDonald, Melina Rose Nolte, Laurie Miller, Cathy Jean Mills, Jacob Mills, Joshua Mills, Hardy Pierce Mills IV, Harold Allen Milton, Mary Louise Milton, Alicia Mixson, Joseph Catlin Mixson, Karon Mixson, Virginia Breann Mixson, Joseph Johnson Mixson, Jr., Baltazar Morin Jr., N.H., Melissa C. Netznik, James Nichols, James R. Nichols, Queen Nichols, Sharon Nichols, Thomas Nichols, Lauren Niquette, Mary Niquette, Sean M. Niquette, Thomas Niquette, Anita Nolte, Jessica Nolte, Melina Rose Nolte, Timothy O'Sullivan, James Michael Ohrt, Michael L. Owen, Sharon Wynona Parker, Andrew Pearcy, Anne Pearcy, Colin Laird Pearcy, Laird Pearcy, Patrick Pearcy, Robert James Pearson, Victoria Elena Phillippi, James Joseph Poole III, Mark Joseph Pratt, Rosa Pratt, Michele Terese Quinn, R.O., Christian Phillips Rodriguez, Allison Poole Roosien, Sonja Ruhren, Haley Russell, Peggy O. Rutkoskie, S.K., Brian Robert Schar, Brad Lee Schwarz, Daniel Wayne Segers, David Larry Segers, Larry Segers, Estrella Sicairos, Jo Ann Sicairos, Martin Sicairos, Martin Sicairos Jr., Andrea Devin Simmons, David Allen Simmons II, Dylan Elijah Smith, Jackay Lynn Smith, Kevin Randall Smith, Mildred Lue Smith, Sonja Ruhren, Arthur B. Stokenbury, Jody Striker, Travis Maccody Strong, T.A. 1, T.A. 2, T.B.H., T.L.C., Koma Kekoa Texeira, Walter Leman Thomas, Tina Louise Houchins, Brima Turay, Ruth Turay, V.T.C., Allen Ryan Vaught, Grant Blaney Von Letkemann, II, Kelly Lynn Von Letkemann, Antonio Harold Ward, Dalis Ward, Dennis Ward, Elizabeth Grace Williams, George Lon Williams, Kayleigh Ann Williams, Nickolas Alan Williams, Sean Lee Williams, Sue Ann Williams, Joshua Bradley Wolfe, Jeff McKinley Wright, Loretta Lucille Young, Roger Lee Young. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dyer, Christopher)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bank Saderat PLC. (dnh)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/16/2019) (ama)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BANK SADERAT Plc, re: #4 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by A.M.K. 1, A.M.K. 2, A.M.M., A.N., Edna Fay Adams, Domenick Jared Alagna, Brian Clark Alldridge, Dianna Alldridge, Joann Alldridge, Ronald Alldridge, Todd Alldridge, Christopher Bryant Anderson, Tahnee Anderson, Eric James Atkinson, Shirley Atkinson, Toni Kay Attanasio, Aaron Bass, Adam Christopher Bass, Harold C Bass, Travis Ryan Bass, Michael James Bell, Denise Beyers, Mark Howard Beyers, William Robert Biggs, Daniel Bivens, Jeanetta Dawn Bivens, Grant Ransom Blackwell, Carol Boyle, David Christofer Boyle, Jayme Boyle, John Boyle, Teray Anton Bundy, Evan Wayne Byler, C.D.R., Guillermo Castillo, Maria Luisa Castillo, Teresita Sapitula Castillo, Wilfredo Ramirez Castillo, William M. Chinn, Heather Nicole Coe, Thomas Milton Coe II, Astra Carlisa Coleman, Tymon Larma Coleman, Melida Collins, Michael Anthony Collins, Quentin D Collins, Shawn Christopher Alan Collins, Siera Nicole Collins, Christine Cooley, Joshua Jonathon Cooley, Anthony Joseph Durkacs, Terrence Alexis Elizenberry, Estate of Christopher Brook Fishbeck, Gary Douglas Fishbeck, Anne Hollingsworth Fondren, Jay Myrle Fondren, Antonio Martinez Frederick, Melvin Jerome Gatewood, Ronald Lynn Gatewood, Jr., Daniel Gautier, Patricia Alexandria Gautier, Hilton Jerome Germany, Jr., James A. Gilbert, Ana M. Gomez, Joseph William Greenalch, Linda Ann Gress, Charles Wayland Griffiths Sr., Kayla Michelle Gulley, Rene Gutel, Miranda Arispe Harelston, Estate of Robert P. Hartwick, Hannah Hartwick, Linda K. Hartwick, Robert A. Hartwick, Crystal Hastings, Laura Fay Hernandez, Ernesto I. Hernandez II, Ernesto P. Hernandez III, Ernesto Hernandez IV, Tayler Heston, Brandon Hinkhouse, Chad Hinkhouse, Kade Luther Hinkhouse, Richard Hinkhouse, Susan Hinkhouse, Gregory Edward Hogancamp, Jonathan Brock Hogge, Joshua Lionel Holladay, Alexis Houchins, Tina Louise Houchins, Tara Kathleen Hutchinson, I.C.C., Jerrald J. Jensen, Wyman Harrell Jones, K.A., K.A.H., K.J.Y., Ioan Adrian Kelemen, Kathey Comeletta Kidd, Douglas Hamilton Kinard Jr., Sara Margaret Kinnel-Frederick, Randall Lavis Klingensmith, Angela Konen, Bruce Kuniholm, Elizabeth Kuniholm, Erin Kuniholm, Jonathan F. Kuniholm, L.D.R.S., Lisa Lambert, M.J.F., John Maine, Andrew Charles Major, Ashley Meikel Major, Randi Jean Martz, Rodney Lewayne McBride, Karyn McDonald, Melina Rose Nolte, Laurie Miller, Cathy Jean Mills, Jacob Mills, Joshua Mills, Hardy Pierce Mills IV, Harold Allen Milton, Mary Louise Milton, Alicia Mixson, Joseph Catlin Mixson, Karon Mixson, Virginia Breann Mixson, Joseph Johnson Mixson, Jr., Baltazar Morin Jr., N.H., Melissa C. Netznik, James Nichols, James R. Nichols, Queen Nichols, Sharon Nichols, Thomas Nichols, Lauren Niquette, Mary Niquette, Sean M. Niquette, Thomas Niquette, Anita Nolte, Jessica Nolte, Melina Rose Nolte, Timothy O'Sullivan, James Michael Ohrt, Michael L. Owen, Sharon Wynona Parker, Andrew Pearcy, Anne Pearcy, Colin Laird Pearcy, Laird Pearcy, Patrick Pearcy, Robert James Pearson, Victoria Elena Phillippi, James Joseph Poole III, Mark Joseph Pratt, Rosa Pratt, Michele Terese Quinn, R.O., Christian Phillips Rodriguez, Allison Poole Roosien, Sonja Ruhren, Haley Russell, Peggy O. Rutkoskie, S.K., Brian Robert Schar, Brad Lee Schwarz, Daniel Wayne Segers, David Larry Segers, Larry Segers, Estrella Sicairos, Jo Ann Sicairos, Martin Sicairos, Martin Sicairos Jr., Andrea Devin Simmons, David Allen Simmons II, Dylan Elijah Smith, Jackay Lynn Smith, Kevin Randall Smith, Mildred Lue Smith, Sonja Ruhren, Arthur B. Stokenbury, Jody Striker, Travis Maccody Strong, T.A. 1, T.A. 2, T.B.H., T.L.C., Koma Kekoa Texeira, Walter Leman Thomas, Tina Louise Houchins, Brima Turay, Ruth Turay, V.T.C., Allen Ryan Vaught, Grant Blaney Von Letkemann, II, Kelly Lynn Von Letkemann, Antonio Harold Ward, Dalis Ward, Dennis Ward, Elizabeth Grace Williams, George Lon Williams, Kayleigh Ann Williams, Nickolas Alan Williams, Sean Lee Williams, Sue Ann Williams, Joshua Bradley Wolfe, Jeff McKinley Wright, Loretta Lucille Young, Roger Lee Young. (Tor, Jeremy)
January 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
January 10, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 10, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-08709-LTS-GWG. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas, S.A., New York Branch, Bank Saderat PLC, Barclays Bank Plc,, Barclays Bank Plc, New York Branch, Commerzbank AG, Commerzbank AG, New York Branch, Credit Agricole Corporate & Investment Bank, Credit Agricole Corporate & Investment Bank, New York Branch, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, New York Branch, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank AG, New York Branch, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank Plc, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Royal Bank of Scotland N.V., Royal Bank of Scotland Plc (n/k/a Natwest Markets Plc), Royal Bank of Scotland Plc (n/k/a Natwest Markets Plc), New York Branch, Standard Chartered Bank, Standard Chartered Bank, New York Branch. Document filed by David Allen Simmons II, Denise Beyers, Jo Ann Sicairos, Laura Fay Hernandez, Brima Turay, Baltazar Morin Jr., David Larry Segers, Sean Lee Williams, Wyman Harrell Jones, Melvin Jerome Gatewood, Harold C Bass, Richard Hinkhouse, Heather Nicole Coe, Eric James Atkinson, Rosa Pratt, Joshua Bradley Wolfe, Shawn Christopher Alan Collins, Wilfredo Ramirez Castillo, Dalis Ward, Jayme Boyle, V.T.C., Travis Maccody Strong, Martin Sicairos Jr., Karon Mixson, Harold Allen Milton, Thomas Milton Coe II, Christopher Bryant Anderson, Ioan Adrian Kelemen, Miranda Arispe Harelston, Toni Kay Attanasio, Angela Konen, Bruce Kuniholm, Jessica Nolte, Joshua Lionel Holladay, Elizabeth Kuniholm, Carol Boyle, Sharon Nichols, Hardy Pierce Mills IV, C.D.R., K.A., Andrea Devin Simmons, Lisa Lambert, Kelly Lynn Von Letkemann, Melina Rose Nolte, Brandon Hinkhouse, Ernesto I. Hernandez II, Ernesto Hernandez IV, Linda K. Hartwick, Allen Ryan Vaught, A.N., Domenick Jared Alagna, Travis Ryan Bass, Larry Segers, Jeanetta Dawn Bivens, Joseph William Greenalch, Jay Myrle Fondren, Mark Joseph Pratt, K.J.Y., Sean M. Niquette, Kayleigh Ann Williams, S.K., Estate of Robert P. Hartwick, Maria Luisa Castillo, T.A. 2, Jody Striker, Antonio Harold Ward, Alexis Houchins, T.L.C., Laird Pearcy, A.M.K. 2, William Robert Biggs, Grant Ransom Blackwell, Loretta Lucille Young, Teresita Sapitula Castillo, Mildred Lue Smith, Michael James Bell, Jonathan F. Kuniholm, Thomas Niquette, Patricia Alexandria Gautier, Peggy O. Rutkoskie, Nickolas Alan Williams, Daniel Gautier, Ana M. Gomez, Roger Lee Young, Cathy Jean Mills, L.D.R.S., A.M.K. 1, Anne Hollingsworth Fondren, Susan Hinkhouse, Melida Collins, Ernesto P. Hernandez III, Ronald Alldridge, Grant Blaney Von Letkemann, II, Dennis Ward, Thomas Nichols, Ruth Turay, Adam Christopher Bass, Andrew Charles Major, Christian Phillips Rodriguez, A.M.M., Estrella Sicairos, Erin Kuniholm, Gregory Edward Hogancamp, Jackay Lynn Smith, Michael Anthony Collins, Queen Nichols, James A. Gilbert, Sara Margaret Kinnel-Frederick, Randall Lavis Klingensmith, Patrick Pearcy, Mark Howard Beyers, Daniel Bivens, Virginia Breann Mixson, Astra Carlisa Coleman, Kevin Randall Smith, Jeff McKinley Wright, Gary Douglas Fishbeck, Elizabeth Grace Williams, Tina Louise Houchins, Hilton Jerome Germany, Jr., Jonathan Brock Hogge, Todd Alldridge, David Christofer Boyle, Michael L. Owen, Rene Gutel, John Maine, R.O., Laurie Miller, James Nichols, Martin Sicairos, Jacob Mills, Rodney Lewayne McBride, Karyn McDonald, Brad Lee Schwarz, Tymon Larma Coleman, Teray Anton Bundy, Kade Luther Hinkhouse, Allison Poole Roosien, Tahnee Anderson, Michele Terese Quinn, James Joseph Poole III, Andrew Pearcy, Antonio Martinez Frederick, K.A.H., M.J.F., Victoria Elena Phillippi, Kayla Michelle Gulley, Mary Louise Milton, Anita Nolte, Ronald Lynn Gatewood, Jr., Haley Russell, Estate of Christopher Brook Fishbeck, Linda Ann Gress, T.B.H., James Michael Ohrt, Kathey Comeletta Kidd, Terrence Alexis Elizenberry, Timothy O'Sullivan, Chad Hinkhouse, Joseph Johnson Mixson, Jr., Siera Nicole Collins, Aaron Bass, Joseph Catlin Mixson, Sue Ann Williams, Sharon Wynona Parker, George Lon Williams, I.C.C., William M. Chinn, John Boyle, Guillermo Castillo, Sonja Ruhren, N.H., Tayler Heston, Tara Kathleen Hutchinson, Walter Leman Thomas, Evan Wayne Byler, Shirley Atkinson, Joshua Jonathon Cooley, Edna Fay Adams, Randi Jean Martz, Douglas Hamilton Kinard Jr., Alicia Mixson, Tina Louise Houchins, Christine Cooley, Melissa C. Netznik, Jerrald J. Jensen, Hannah Hartwick, Daniel Wayne Segers, Robert A. Hartwick, Melina Rose Nolte, Crystal Hastings, Arthur B. Stokenbury, Charles Wayland Griffiths Sr., T.A. 1, Ashley Meikel Major, Brian Clark Alldridge, Dylan Elijah Smith, Colin Laird Pearcy, Lauren Niquette, James R. Nichols, Quentin D Collins, Dianna Alldridge, Sonja Ruhren, Joshua Mills, Anne Pearcy, Joann Alldridge, Anthony Joseph Durkacs, Brian Robert Schar, Mary Niquette, Robert James Pearson, Koma Kekoa Texeira.(Tor, Jeremy)
January 2, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Tina Louise Houchins, Melina Rose Nolte, Sonja Ruhren added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,.Document filed by Tina Louise Houchins, Melina Rose Nolte, Sonja Ruhren. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,.(Tor, Jeremy)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremy Aaron Tor. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Est. of Christopher Brook Fishbeck. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
January 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Laura Taylor Swain as possibly related to 17cv8709. (pc)
January 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jeremy Aaron Tor to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add Estate of Christopher Brook Fishbeck to CM ECF. Add Tina Louise Houchins, Melina Rose Nolte, Sonja Ruhren in their capacities as listed on the complaint caption title (eg For the Estate of etc.). Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremy Aaron Tor. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: A.M.M., T.A. 1, Mary Louise Milton, Tina Louise Houchins, Melina Rose Nolte, Sonja Ruhren,. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc)
December 29, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-8709. Document filed by A.M.K. 1, A.M.K. 2, A.M.M., A.N., Edna Fay Adams, Domenick Jared Alagna, Brian Clark Alldridge, Dianna Alldridge, Joann Alldridge, Ronald Alldridge, Todd Alldridge, Christopher Bryant Anderson, Tahnee Anderson, Eric James Atkinson, Shirley Atkinson, Toni Kay Attanasio, Aaron Bass, Adam Christopher Bass, Harold C Bass, Travis Ryan Bass, Michael James Bell, Denise Beyers, Mark Howard Beyers, William Robert Biggs, Daniel Bivens, Jeanetta Dawn Bivens, Grant Ransom Blackwell, Carol Boyle, David Christofer Boyle, Jayme Boyle, John Boyle, Teray Anton Bundy, Evan Wayne Byler, C.D.R., Guillermo Castillo, Maria Luisa Castillo, Teresita Sapitula Castillo, Wilfredo Ramirez Castillo, William M. Chinn, Heather Nicole Coe, Thomas Milton Coe II, Astra Carlisa Coleman, Tymon Larma Coleman, Melida Collins, Michael Anthony Collins, Quentin D Collins, Shawn Christopher Alan Collins, Siera Nicole Collins, Christine Cooley, Joshua Jonathon Cooley, Anthony Joseph Durkacs, Terrence Alexis Elizenberry, Est. of Christopher Brook Fishbeck, Gary Douglas Fishbeck, Anne Hollingsworth Fondren, Jay Myrle Fondren, Antonio Martinez Frederick, Melvin Jerome Gatewood, Ronald Lynn Gatewood, Jr., Daniel Gautier, Patricia Alexandria Gautier, Hilton Jerome Germany, Jr., James A. Gilbert, Ana M. Gomez, Joseph William Greenalch, Linda Ann Gress, Charles Wayland Griffiths Sr., Kayla Michelle Gulley, Rene Gutel, Miranda Arispe Harelston, Estate of Robert P. Hartwick, Hannah Hartwick, Linda K. Hartwick, Robert A. Hartwick, Crystal Hastings, Laura Fay Hernandez, Ernesto I. Hernandez II, Ernesto P. Hernandez III, Ernesto Hernandez IV, Tayler Heston, Brandon Hinkhouse, Chad Hinkhouse, Kade Luther Hinkhouse, Richard Hinkhouse, Susan Hinkhouse, Gregory Edward Hogancamp, Jonathan Brock Hogge, Joshua Lionel Holladay, Alexis Houchins, Tina Louise Houchins, Tara Kathleen Hutchinson, I.C.C., Jerrald J. Jensen, Wyman Harrell Jones, K.A., K.A.H., K.J.Y., Ioan Adrian Kelemen, Kathey Comeletta Kidd, Douglas Hamilton Kinard Jr., Sara Margaret Kinnel-Frederick, Randall Lavis Klingensmith, Angela Konen, Bruce Kuniholm, Elizabeth Kuniholm, Erin Kuniholm, Jonathan F. Kuniholm, L.D.R.S., Lisa Lambert, M.J.F., John Maine, Andrew Charles Major, Ashley Meikel Major, Randi Jean Martz, Rodney Lewayne McBride, Karyn McDonald, Laurie Miller, Cathy Jean Mills, Jacob Mills, Joshua Mills, Hardy Pierce Mills IV, Harold Allen Milton, Mary Louise Milton, Alicia Mixson, Joseph Catlin Mixson, Karon Mixson, Virginia Breann Mixson, Joseph Johnson Mixson, Jr., Baltazar Morin Jr., N.H., Melissa C. Netznik, James Nichols, James R. Nichols, Queen Nichols, Sharon Nichols, Thomas Nichols, Lauren Niquette, Mary Niquette, Sean M. Niquette, Thomas Niquette, Anita Nolte, Jessica Nolte, Melina Rose Nolte, Timothy O'Sullivan, James Michael Ohrt, Michael L. Owen, Sharon Wynona Parker, Andrew Pearcy, Anne Pearcy, Colin Laird Pearcy, Laird Pearcy, Patrick Pearcy, Robert James Pearson, Victoria Elena Phillippi, James Joseph Poole III, Mark Joseph Pratt, Rosa Pratt, Michele Terese Quinn, R.O., Christian Phillips Rodriguez, Allison Poole Roosien, Sonja Ruhren, Haley Russell, Peggy O. Rutkoskie, S.K., Brian Robert Schar, Brad Lee Schwarz, Daniel Wayne Segers, David Larry Segers, Larry Segers, Estrella Sicairos, Jo Ann Sicairos, Martin Sicairos, Martin Sicairos Jr., Andrea Devin Simmons, David Allen Simmons II, Dylan Elijah Smith, Jackay Lynn Smith, Kevin Randall Smith, Mildred Lue Smith, Arthur B. Stokenbury, Jody Striker, Travis Maccody Strong, T.A. 1, T.A. 2, T.B.H., T.L.C., Koma Kekoa Texeira, Walter Leman Thomas, Brima Turay, Ruth Turay, V.T.C., Allen Ryan Vaught, Grant Blaney Von Letkemann, II, Kelly Lynn Von Letkemann, Antonio Harold Ward, Dalis Ward, Dennis Ward, Elizabeth Grace Williams, George Lon Williams, Kayleigh Ann Williams, Nickolas Alan Williams, Sean Lee Williams, Sue Ann Williams, Joshua Bradley Wolfe, Jeff McKinley Wright, Loretta Lucille Young, Roger Lee Young.(Tor, Jeremy)
December 29, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Tor, Jeremy)
December 29, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank AG, New York Branch, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank Plc, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Commerzbank AG, Commerzbank AG, New York Branch, Barclays Bank Plc,, Barclays Bank Plc, New York Branch, BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas, S.A., New York Branch, Standard Chartered Bank, Standard Chartered Bank, New York Branch, Royal Bank of Scotland N.V., Royal Bank of Scotland Plc (n/k/a Natwest Markets Plc), Royal Bank of Scotland Plc (n/k/a Natwest Markets Plc), New York Branch, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Agricole Corporate & Investment Bank, Credit Agricole Corporate & Investment Bank, New York Branch, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, New York Branch, Bank Saderat PLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16119256)Document filed by Harold C Bass, Eric James Atkinson, Harold Allen Milton, Christopher Bryant Anderson, K.A., Domenick Jared Alagna, Travis Ryan Bass, T.A. 2, Ronald Alldridge, Andrew Charles Major, A.M.M., Todd Alldridge, Tahnee Anderson, Mary Louise Milton, Timothy O'Sullivan, T.A. 1, Ashley Meikel Major, Brian Clark Alldridge, Dianna Alldridge, Joann Alldridge, Robert A. Hartwick, Rosa Pratt, Arthur B. Stokenbury, James Nichols, Tymon Larma Coleman, Andrew Pearcy, Anita Nolte, M.J.F., C.D.R., Andrea Devin Simmons, Ernesto Hernandez IV, Teray Anton Bundy, Victoria Elena Phillippi, James Michael Ohrt, Linda Ann Gress, Sara Margaret Kinnel-Frederick, Mark Howard Beyers, Brandon Hinkhouse, Miranda Arispe Harelston, Estrella Sicairos, Jay Myrle Fondren, Joshua Bradley Wolfe, Melina Rose Nolte, Aaron Bass, Jo Ann Sicairos, Elizabeth Grace Williams, Lauren Niquette, L.D.R.S., Grant Blaney Von Letkemann, II, I.C.C., David Larry Segers, Teresita Sapitula Castillo, Angela Konen, Gary Douglas Fishbeck, Joseph William Greenalch, Antonio Harold Ward, Sharon Nichols, Siera Nicole Collins, Brima Turay, Tayler Heston, Hannah Hartwick, Loretta Lucille Young, A.M.K. 1, Guillermo Castillo, Melissa C. Netznik, Brian Robert Schar, Walter Leman Thomas, Joseph Johnson Mixson, Jr., Elizabeth Kuniholm, William Robert Biggs, Rene Gutel, Sue Ann Williams, Quentin D Collins, Thomas Milton Coe II, Christine Cooley, David Christofer Boyle, Nickolas Alan Williams, Shirley Atkinson, Daniel Wayne Segers, Melida Collins, James A. Gilbert, Mary Niquette, Chad Hinkhouse, Kayleigh Ann Williams, Christian Phillips Rodriguez, T.L.C., Jacob Mills, Ernesto P. Hernandez III, Laird Pearcy, Jackay Lynn Smith, Kevin Randall Smith, Jody Striker, Jeanetta Dawn Bivens, T.B.H., Shawn Christopher Alan Collins, Edna Fay Adams, Dalis Ward, Robert James Pearson, Allen Ryan Vaught, Melvin Jerome Gatewood, S.K., Linda K. Hartwick, Baltazar Morin Jr., Ioan Adrian Kelemen, Kade Luther Hinkhouse, Peggy O. Rutkoskie, Rodney Lewayne McBride, Dennis Ward, Estate of Robert P. Hartwick, Martin Sicairos Jr., John Boyle, A.M.K. 2, Hardy Pierce Mills IV, Mark Joseph Pratt, Jeff McKinley Wright, Hilton Jerome Germany, Jr., Michael James Bell, Sean M. Niquette, Anne Hollingsworth Fondren, Daniel Bivens, Koma Kekoa Texeira, Queen Nichols, Virginia Breann Mixson, James R. Nichols, Joshua Jonathon Cooley, N.H., Douglas Hamilton Kinard Jr., Thomas Nichols, James Joseph Poole III, Kayla Michelle Gulley, Patricia Alexandria Gautier, Randall Lavis Klingensmith, R.O., Maria Luisa Castillo, Adam Christopher Bass, Wilfredo Ramirez Castillo, Ronald Lynn Gatewood, Jr., Laura Fay Hernandez, Tina Louise Houchins, K.J.Y., Jonathan F. Kuniholm, Kelly Lynn Von Letkemann, Tara Kathleen Hutchinson, Erin Kuniholm, Karyn McDonald, Bruce Kuniholm, Toni Kay Attanasio, Anthony Joseph Durkacs, Jayme Boyle, William M. Chinn, Antonio Martinez Frederick, Brad Lee Schwarz, Haley Russell, Randi Jean Martz, Evan Wayne Byler, K.A.H., Thomas Niquette, Karon Mixson, Charles Wayland Griffiths Sr., Larry Segers, Kathey Comeletta Kidd, Michael Anthony Collins, Susan Hinkhouse, Jerrald J. Jensen, Michael L. Owen, Colin Laird Pearcy, Astra Carlisa Coleman, Gregory Edward Hogancamp, Sharon Wynona Parker, Ernesto I. Hernandez II, John Maine, Daniel Gautier, A.N., Alexis Houchins, Joshua Lionel Holladay, Ana M. Gomez, Crystal Hastings, Joshua Mills, Wyman Harrell Jones, Martin Sicairos, Anne Pearcy, Cathy Jean Mills, Richard Hinkhouse, V.T.C., Est. of Christopher Brook Fishbeck, Ruth Turay, Carol Boyle, Heather Nicole Coe, Jessica Nolte, George Lon Williams, Lisa Lambert, Denise Beyers, Sean Lee Williams, Roger Lee Young, Dylan Elijah Smith, Alicia Mixson, Laurie Miller, Michele Terese Quinn, David Allen Simmons II, Travis Maccody Strong, Terrence Alexis Elizenberry, Grant Ransom Blackwell, Allison Poole Roosien, Sonja Ruhren, Patrick Pearcy, Mildred Lue Smith, Jonathan Brock Hogge, Joseph Catlin Mixson.(Tor, Jeremy) Modified on 1/2/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Sullivan et al v. Deutsche Bank AG et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Bryant Anderson
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.M.M.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy O'Sullivan
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domenick Jared Alagna
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.A.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric James Atkinson
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Louise Milton
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.A. 2
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Alldridge
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Alldridge
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianna Alldridge
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Allen Milton
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Alldridge
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Ryan Bass
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tahnee Anderson
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold C Bass
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Charles Major
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Meikel Major
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Clark Alldridge
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.A. 1
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Ramirez Castillo
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Pearcy
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan F. Kuniholm
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Edward Hogancamp
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Mills
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Louise Houchins
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Ruhren
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Robert P. Hartwick
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Nichols
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff McKinley Wright
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bivens
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Pearcy
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Nichols
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyman Harrell Jones
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baltazar Morin Jr.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Grace Williams
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Mixson
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Margaret Kinnel-Frederick
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda K. Hartwick
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Sicairos
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph William Greenalch
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Michael Ohrt
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanetta Dawn Bivens
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Nichols
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Pearcy
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Nicole Coe
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Wayne Segers
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Lee Schwarz
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Wayland Griffiths Sr.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Atkinson
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy O. Rutkoskie
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Lambert
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Niquette
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ioan Adrian Kelemen
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Hamilton Kinard Jr.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brima Turay
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Bass
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Nolte
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Breann Mixson
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Terese Quinn
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Devin Simmons
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Cooley
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.D.R.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Lee Williams
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Ann Williams
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Pratt
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Hastings
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Catlin Mixson
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresita Sapitula Castillo
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koma Kekoa Texeira
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teray Anton Bundy
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Johnson Mixson, Jr.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Howard Beyers
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Robert Schar
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siera Nicole Collins
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karyn McDonald
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estrella Sicairos
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Lee Young
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Ward
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Harold Ward
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.J.Y.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Owen
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Leman Thomas
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Boyle
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Niquette
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Hinkhouse
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.J.F.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Randall Smith
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayleigh Ann Williams
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Ann Gress
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayme Boyle
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Kuniholm
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Myrle Fondren
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Poole Roosien
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Hartwick
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Boyle
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Gutel
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Gilbert
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Segers
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Lewayne McBride
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Milton Coe II
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert James Pearson
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Nolte
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melida Collins
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nickolas Alan Williams
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Larry Segers
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Beyers
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melina Rose Nolte
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.B.H.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Lynn Von Letkemann
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Elena Phillippi
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Kathleen Hutchinson
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Lue Smith
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.K.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Russell
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Maine
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Hartwick
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Joseph Poole III
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Anthony Collins
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Bradley Wolfe
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Hinkhouse
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur B. Stokenbury
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Christopher Brook Fishbeck
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quentin D Collins
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randi Jean Martz
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Alexis Elizenberry
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto P. Hernandez III
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Konen
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathey Comeletta Kidd
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Maccody Strong
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Jerome Gatewood
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Michelle Gulley
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.M.K. 2
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laird Pearcy
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Joseph Durkacs
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Gautier
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Elijah Smith
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Luisa Castillo
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Lon Williams
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Douglas Fishbeck
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilton Jerome Germany, Jr.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalis Ward
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean M. Niquette
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Houchins
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.M.K. 1
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.A.H.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Robert Biggs
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miranda Arispe Harelston
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astra Carlisa Coleman
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto I. Hernandez II
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Brock Hogge
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Laird Pearcy
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Hinkhouse
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.O.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Christopher Bass
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Nichols
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.D.R.S.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Christofer Boyle
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Sicairos Jr.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Martinez Frederick
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.C.C.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tymon Larma Coleman
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lynn Gatewood, Jr.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Lavis Klingensmith
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.N.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Mills
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Wayne Byler
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Alexandria Gautier
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Jonathon Cooley
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Phillips Rodriguez
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Joseph Pratt
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Blaney Von Letkemann, II
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Kuniholm
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James Bell
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Castillo
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.H.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.L.C.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Lionel Holladay
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Striker
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Turay
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tayler Heston
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Allen Simmons II
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Wynona Parker
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Lucille Young
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Miller
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Fay Adams
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Niquette
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Jean Mills
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William M. Chinn
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Hernandez IV
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hardy Pierce Mills IV
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Kay Attanasio
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kade Luther Hinkhouse
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karon Mixson
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa C. Netznik
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Kuniholm
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Ryan Vaught
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana M. Gomez
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hinkhouse
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V.T.C.
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Queen Nichols
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackay Lynn Smith
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Fay Hernandez
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrald J. Jensen
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Christopher Alan Collins
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Ransom Blackwell
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Hollingsworth Fondren
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Sicairos
Represented By: Jeremy Aaron Tor
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: James Magazine
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Winston Troy Bouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Scotland Plc (n/k/a Natwest Markets Plc), New York Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerzbank AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Agricole Corporate & Investment Bank, New York Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerzbank AG, New York Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Chartered Bank, New York Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Saderat PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Agricole Corporate & Investment Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank Plc, New York Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas, S.A., New York Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Scotland N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse AG, New York Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG, New York Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt |