IN RE: ICE LIBOR ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Plaintiff: Putnam Bank
Defendant: Lloyds Securities Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., BNP Paribas SA, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Societe Generale S.A., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Royal Bank of Canada, Barclays PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., MUFG Bank, Ltd., Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, UBS AG, Citibank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, ICE Benchmark Administration Limited (f/k/a NYSE Euronext Rate Administration Limited), UBS Securities LLC, Lloyds Bank PLC,, Natwest Markets Securities Inc. (f/k/a RBS Securities, Inc.), Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Credit Agricole S.A., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, National Westminster Bank PLC, Credit Suisse AG, Citigroup Inc., MUFG SECURITIES AMERICAS INC., HSBC Holdings plc, The Norinchukin Bank, HSBC Bank PLC, UBS Group AG, Bank of America N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Credit Suisse Group AG, ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Bank of America Corporation, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd., ICE Data Services, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Natwest Markets Securities Inc., ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, NatWest Markets Plc and The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC
Consolidated Plaintiff: City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund and Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund
Case Number: 1:2019cv00439
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 284 NOTICE OF MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF PETER DEMATO AS COUNSEL OF RECORD AND ORDER granting #283 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. PUTNAM BANK, CITY OF LIVONIA EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, CITY OF LIVONIA RETIREE HEAL TH AND DISABILITY BENEFITS PLAN, HAW All SHEET METAL WORKERS HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, HAWAII SHEET METAL WORKERS TRAINING FUND, HAWAII SHEET METAL WORKERS ANNUITY FUND, and HAWAII SHEET METAL WORKERS PENSION FUND ("Plaintiffs") respectfully move, pursuant to Local Rule 1.4, for leave to withdraw the appearance of Peter Demato as counsel for Plaintiffs. As of February 7, 2020, Mr. Demato will no longer be associated with Lowey Dannenberg, P.C. Lowey Dannenberg will continue to be counsel of record for Plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/12/2020) (mro)
February 7, 2020 Filing 283 MOTION for Peter Demato to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Putnam Bank..(Levis, Christian)
February 6, 2020 Filing 282 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Peter A. Barile III dated 2/6/2020 re: 1/30/20 Hearing materials. Document filed by City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Putnam Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Parallel Pricing submission, #2 Exhibit 2 - Statements, #3 Exhibit 3 - Presentation slides).(Barile, Peter)
January 30, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Oral Argument held on 1/30/2020 re: (245 in 1:19-cv-00439-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., (269 in 1:19-cv-00439-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by MUFG Bank, Ltd., (204 in 1:19-cv-00439-GBD) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by Barclays Capital Inc., Bank of America Corporation, ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., Lloyds Bank PLC,, Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Credit Suisse AG, HSBC Bank PLC, Barclays Bank PLC, Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Lloyds Securities Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Societe Generale S.A., The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Barclays PLC, Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, UBS Securities LLC, Credit Suisse Group AG, UBS Group AG, Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., The Norinchukin Bank, BNP Paribas SA, SG Americas Securities, LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Royal Bank of Canada, Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., UBS AG, Bank of America N.A., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., National Westminster Bank PLC, Deutsche Bank AG, MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Natwest Markets Securities Inc., Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., ICE Data Services, Inc., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., HSBC Holdings plc, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Credit Agricole S.A., NatWest Markets Plc. Plaintiff Counsel: Peter Anthny Barile, III; Christian Levis; Stacey Paige SlaughterDefense Counsel: Adam Selim Hakki; Paul Steel Mishkin; Alan Craig Turner; Joel Laurence Kurtzberg; David Sapir Lesser and court reporter present. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00439-GBD, 1:19-cv-00965-GBD, 1:19-cv-02002-GBD(Vega, Elizabeth)
January 30, 2020 Filing 281 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christian Levis on behalf of City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Putnam Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00439-GBD, 1:19-cv-00965-GBD, 1:19-cv-02002-GBD(Levis, Christian)
January 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REJECTION OF PROPOSED ORDER TO BRING PERSONAL ELECTRONIC DEVICE(S) OR GENERAL PURPOSE COMPUTING DEVICE(S) INTO THE COURTHOUSES OF THE SDNY FOR USE IN A PROCEEDING OR TRIAL. Notice to Attorney Steven Jodlowski re: Document #280 Proposed Order, was rejected by the Clerk's Office for the following reason, the Order to Bring Personal Electronic Device(s) or General Purpose Computing Device(s) Into the Courthouses of the SDNY for Use in a Proceeding or Trial should not be electronically filed. Please download and review the Local Rules, Judge's Individual Rules of Practice and ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions.. (dt)
January 27, 2020 Filing 280 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - < PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health < Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Putnam Bank. Related Document Number: #279 . (Jodlowski, Steven) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 1/28/2020 (dt).
January 27, 2020 Filing 279 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Steven M. Jodlowski dated 01/27/2020 re: Application to Bring Personal Electronic Devices for Use in Proceeding. Document filed by City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Putnam Bank.(Jodlowski, Steven)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL, PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that, upon the annexed declaration of Maxwell Kosman and subject to the approval of the Court, Maxwell Kosman hereby withdraws as counsel for Deutsche Bank AG and Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., and shall be removed from the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) notification list in the above-captioned matter. Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP will continue to represent Deutsche Bank AG and Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. in this proceeding. So Ordered. (Attorney Maxwell Arlie Halpern Kosman terminated.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/24/20) (yv)
January 23, 2020 Filing 277 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Kosman, Maxwell)
January 17, 2020 Filing 276 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Christopher M. Viapiano dated 1/17/2020 re: Response to Plaintiffs' January 14, 2020 Letter. Document filed by MUFG Bank, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Service on Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc.)(Viapiano, Christopher)
January 14, 2020 Filing 275 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Peter A. Barile III dated 1/14/2020 re: Service of process on MUFG Bank Ltd.. Document filed by City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Putnam Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MUFG Bank letter)(Barile, Peter)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting #271 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The motion is granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney Olivia Renensland terminated. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/30/2019) (rj)
December 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #273 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
December 20, 2019 Filing 273 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc.. Related Document Number: #271 . (Renensland, Olivia) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
December 20, 2019 Filing 272 DECLARATION of Olivia H. Renensland, dated December 20, 2019 in Support re: #271 MOTION for Olivia H. Renensland to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc.. (Renensland, Olivia)
December 20, 2019 Filing 271 MOTION for Olivia H. Renensland to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc..(Renensland, Olivia)
December 19, 2019 Filing 270 DECLARATION of Hiroshi Inoue in Support re: #269 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by MUFG Bank, Ltd.. (Viapiano, Christopher)
December 19, 2019 Filing 269 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by MUFG Bank, Ltd..(Viapiano, Christopher)
December 19, 2019 Filing 268 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by BNP Paribas SA, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc., MUFG Bank, Ltd., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., NatWest Markets Plc, National Westminster Bank PLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., Societe Generale S.A., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., The Norinchukin Bank, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Securities LLC. (Lesser, David)
December 19, 2019 Filing 267 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc.. (Hakki, Adam)
December 19, 2019 Filing 266 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by BNP Paribas SA, Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays PLC, Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings plc, ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, Lloyds Bank PLC,, MUFG Bank, Ltd., Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., NatWest Markets Plc, National Westminster Bank PLC, Royal Bank of Canada, Societe Generale S.A., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., The Norinchukin Bank, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, UBS AG, UBS Group AG. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
December 19, 2019 Filing 265 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Philip Devlin, III on behalf of MUFG Bank, Ltd.. (Devlin, Michael)
December 19, 2019 Filing 264 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth A Cassady on behalf of MUFG Bank, Ltd.. (Cassady, Elizabeth)
December 19, 2019 Filing 263 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. for MUFG Bank, Ltd.. Document filed by MUFG Bank, Ltd..(Viapiano, Christopher)
December 19, 2019 Filing 262 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Michael Viapiano on behalf of MUFG Bank, Ltd.. (Viapiano, Christopher)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting #260 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/19/2019) (rj)
December 17, 2019 Filing 260 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Memoranda of Law in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jamie Dycus dated December 17, 2019. Document filed by BNP Paribas SA, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc., MUFG Bank, Ltd., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., NatWest Markets Plc, National Westminster Bank PLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., Societe Generale S.A., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd., The Norinchukin Bank, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Securities LLC.(Dycus, Jamie)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MICHAEL P. SRODOSKI granting #258 Motion for Michael P. Srodoski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/20/2019) (mro)
November 19, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #258 MOTION for Michael P. Srodoski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18095032. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
November 19, 2019 Filing 258 MOTION for Michael P. Srodoski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18095032. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Srodoski, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Filing 257 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #245 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint., #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
November 12, 2019 Filing 256 DECLARATION of David R. Scott in Opposition re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint., #245 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Putnam Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 1 month Libor data, #2 Exhibit 2 - 3 month Libor data, #3 Exhibit 3 - Code of Conduct, #4 Exhibit 4 - Federal Reserve, #5 Exhibit 5 - 1 month overlay, #6 Exhibit 6 - 3 month overlay, #7 Exhibit 7 - Twombley complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 - Wheatley report, #9 Exhibit 9 - screenshot, #10 Exhibit 10 - Tracking the Libor Rate, #11 Exhibit 11 - Libor manipulation, #12 Exhibit 12 - DB report, #13 Exhibit 13 - Wherefore art thou, #14 Exhibit 14 - ICE report Jan. 2019, #15 Exhibit 15 - ICE report April 2019, #16 Exhibit 16 - the new new Libor, #17 Exhibit 17 - charts, #18 Exhibit 18 - charts, #19 Exhibit 19 - a zombie Libor)(Scott, David)
November 12, 2019 Filing 255 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #245 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint., #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
November 12, 2019 Filing 254 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. Document filed by Putnam Bank; Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund; Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund; Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund; Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund; City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System; City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan. (Demato, Peter)
November 12, 2019 Filing 253 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Demato, Jr on behalf of City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Putnam Bank. (Demato, Peter)
October 30, 2019 Filing 252 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin W Batten on behalf of Putnam Bank. (Batten, Justin)
October 22, 2019 Filing 251 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate NB Holdings for Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc.; Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate BANA Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation for Bank of America N.A.; Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank of America Corporation. Document filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc..(Mishkin, Paul)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #247 Letter, filed by Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Putnam Bank, City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/18/2019) (ks)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows: Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' motions to dismiss brought under Rules 12(b)(l), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6), on or before November 12, 2019. Defendants shall reply to Plaintiffs' response on or before December 19, 2019. Plaintiffs, having withdrawn their request to hold personal jurisdiction briefing in abeyance, that request is hereby deemed withdrawn and denied as moot. No other dates shall be affected by this Order. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint., #245 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (Responses due by 11/12/2019, Replies due by 12/19/2019.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/18/2019) (rro) Modified on 11/21/2019 (rro).
October 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #248 Proposed Order, was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
October 17, 2019 Filing 248 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Putnam Bank. Related Document Number: #247 . (Barile, Peter) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 17, 2019 Filing 247 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Peter A. Barile III dated 10/17/2019 re: Extension of Time on Briefing Schedule. Document filed by City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Putnam Bank.(Barile, Peter)
October 4, 2019 Filing 246 DECLARATION of Hiroshi Inoue in Support re: #245 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc.. (Viapiano, Christopher)
October 4, 2019 Filing 245 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc..(Viapiano, Christopher)
October 4, 2019 Filing 244 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Philip Devlin, III on behalf of Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc.. (Devlin, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Filing 243 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth A Cassady on behalf of Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc.. (Cassady, Elizabeth)
October 4, 2019 Filing 242 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc..(Viapiano, Christopher)
October 4, 2019 Filing 241 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Michael Viapiano on behalf of Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc.. (Viapiano, Christopher)
October 2, 2019 Filing 240 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Peter A. Barile III dated 10/2/2019 re: stay on MTD order. Document filed by City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Putnam Bank.(Barile, Peter)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #237 Letter. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/1/2019) (jwh)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: An oral argument is scheduled for January 30, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. (Oral Argument set for 1/30/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/30/2019) (jwh)
September 26, 2019 Filing 237 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Peter A. Barile III dated 9/26/2019 re: Adjourn CMC. Document filed by City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Putnam Bank.(Barile, Peter)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting #235 Motion for D. Jarrett Arp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/26/2019) (cf)
September 24, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #235 MOTION for D. Jarrett Arp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17648203. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 23, 2019 Filing 235 MOTION for D. Jarrett Arp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17648203. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Jarrett Arp, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Arp, David)
September 4, 2019 Filing 234 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Nourse Gross on behalf of Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc.. (Gross, Alexander)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows: 1. As set forth in the CMO, Plaintiffs filed the CAC which was entered on the docket on July 1, 2019. 2. Credit Suisse Group AG shall have 60 days from the date of filing of Plaintiffs' CAC to file its answer, motions to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the CAC. If Credit Suisse Group AG moves to dismiss (whether individually or with one or more Defendants named in the CMO), Plaintiffs shall then have 60 days to respond, and Credit Suisse Group AO shall then have 30 days to file a reply in further support of their motion(s) (whether individually or with one or more Defendants named in the CMO). 3. No defense of Credit Suisse Group AG to the claims in this action, including without limitation defenses based upon lack of personal jurisdiction, lack of standing, insufficient service of process, improper venue or a defendant having been improperly named, is prejudiced or waived by the execution or filing of this Stipulation. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/3/2019) (mro)
August 30, 2019 Filing 232 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc.. (Hakki, Adam)
August 30, 2019 Filing 231 DECLARATION of Adam S. Hakki in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by BNP Paribas SA, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., NatWest Markets Plc, National Westminster Bank PLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., Societe Generale S.A., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., The Norinchukin Bank, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Hakki, Adam)
August 30, 2019 Filing 230 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by BNP Paribas SA, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., NatWest Markets Plc, National Westminster Bank PLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., Societe Generale S.A., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., The Norinchukin Bank, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Securities LLC. (Hakki, Adam)
August 30, 2019 Filing 229 DECLARATION of Stelios Tselikas in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by ICE Benchmark Administration Limited. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 228 DECLARATION of Karen Pisarczyk in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by HSBC Holdings plc. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 227 DECLARATION of Loren Wulfsohn in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by HSBC Bank PLC. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 226 DECLARATION of Yuji Yamaguchi in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by The Norinchukin Bank. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 225 DECLARATION of Steve Bullock in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc.. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 224 DECLARATION of Stephen Dolmatch in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc.. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 223 DECLARATION of Richard McCarty in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by NatWest Markets Plc, National Westminster Bank PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 222 DECLARATION of Pierre Minor in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Agricole S.A.. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 221 DECLARATION of Philip Kirkpatrick in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A.. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 220 DECLARATION of Klaroen Kruidhof in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A.. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 219 DECLARATION of Paul Serritella in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Royal Bank of Canada. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 218 DECLARATION of Kristen Ciccimarra in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 217 DECLARATION of John Hilty in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 216 DECLARATION of John Connors in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by UBS AG. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 215 DECLARATION of Stephen Shapiro in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Barclays PLC. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 214 DECLARATION of Jason Wright in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Barclays Bank PLC. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 213 DECLARATION of Ian Jameson in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd.. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 212 DECLARATION of Hiroshi Higuma in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 211 DECLARATION of Haruyuki Yoshikawa in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc.. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 210 DECLARATION of Francois Draveny in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by BNP Paribas SA. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 209 DECLARATION of Daniel Klay in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse Group AG. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 208 DECLARATION of Damian Hess in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 207 DECLARATION of Cecile Di Meglio in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Societe Generale S.A.. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 206 DECLARATION of Bruno Fontaine in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 205 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, and/or Inadequate Service. Document filed by BNP Paribas SA, Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays PLC, Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings plc, ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, Lloyds Bank PLC,, NatWest Markets Plc, National Westminster Bank PLC, Royal Bank of Canada, Societe Generale S.A., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., The Norinchukin Bank, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, UBS AG, UBS Group AG. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 204 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by BNP Paribas SA, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., NatWest Markets Plc, National Westminster Bank PLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., Societe Generale S.A., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., The Norinchukin Bank, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Securities LLC.(Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 29, 2019 Filing 203 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lev Louis Dassin on behalf of Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc.. (Dassin, Lev)
August 29, 2019 Filing 202 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Citicorp LLC for Citibank, N.A.; Corporate Parent Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Global Market Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. Document filed by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc..(Cooper, Roger)
August 27, 2019 Filing 201 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Credit Suisse Group AG. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting #197 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/27/2019) (jwh)
August 23, 2019 Filing 199 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Olivia Renensland on behalf of Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc.. (Renensland, Olivia)
August 23, 2019 Filing 198 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roger Allen Cooper on behalf of Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc.. (Cooper, Roger)
August 22, 2019 Filing 197 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Paul Mishkin dated August 22, 2019. Document filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., National Westminster Bank PLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., Societe Generale S.A., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., The Norinchukin Bank, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Securities LLC.(Mishkin, Paul)
August 7, 2019 Filing 196 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Shawn Mintz on behalf of Credit Suisse Group AG. (Mintz, Adam)
August 7, 2019 Filing 195 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Credit Suisse Group AG.(Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 7, 2019 Filing 194 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Herbert Scott Washer on behalf of Credit Suisse Group AG. (Washer, Herbert)
August 7, 2019 Filing 193 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Beth Perlgut on behalf of Credit Suisse Group AG. (Perlgut, Lauren)
August 7, 2019 Filing 192 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elai E. Katz on behalf of Credit Suisse Group AG. (Katz, Elai)
August 7, 2019 Filing 191 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Michael Hall on behalf of Credit Suisse Group AG. (Hall, Jason)
August 7, 2019 Filing 190 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel Laurence Kurtzberg on behalf of Credit Suisse Group AG. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #188 Letter,, filed by Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Putnam Bank, City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System. ENDORSEMENT: The status conference is adjourned from August 8, 2019 to October 3, 2019 at 9:45 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/7/2019) (kv)
August 6, 2019 Filing 188 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Peter A. Barile III dated 08/06/2019 re: an Adjournment of the Case Management Conference Scheduled for August 8, 2019. Document filed by City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Putnam Bank.(Barile, Peter)
August 1, 2019 Filing 187 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. Credit Suisse Group AG served on 7/5/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. Service was accepted by Credit Suisse Group AG. Document filed by Putnam Bank; Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund; Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund; Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund; Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund; City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System; City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan. (Barile, Peter)
July 1, 2019 Filing 186 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,,,,, against BNP Paribas SA, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc., MUFG SECURITIES AMERICAS INC., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., National Westminster Bank PLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., Societe Generale S.A., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., The Norinchukin Bank, UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Securities LLC, MUFG Bank, Ltd., The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, NatWest Markets plc (F.K.A. The Royal Bank of Scotland plc) with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Putnam Bank, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USD ICE LIBOR 1-Month and 3-Month Chart, #2 Exhibit B - USD ICE LIBOR 1-Month Chart, #3 Exhibit C - USD ICE LIBOR 3-Month Chart)(Scott, David)
June 25, 2019 Filing 185 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carol Lee O'Keefe on behalf of Putnam Bank. (O'Keefe, Carol)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows: The schedule set forth in the CMO will apply to BNP Paribas SA. Pursuant to that schedule, BNP Paribas SA shall have 60 days from the date of filing of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint ("CAC") to file its answer, motions to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the CAC. No defense of BNP Paribas SA to the claims in this action, including without limitation defenses based upon lack of personal jurisdiction, lack of standing, insufficient service of process, improper venue or a defendant having been improperly named, is prejudiced or waived by the execution or filing of this Stipulation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/14/2019) (ama)
June 13, 2019 Filing 183 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by BNP Paribas SA. (Goldberg, Joshua)
June 7, 2019 Filing 182 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. BNP Paribas SA served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. Service was made by Mail (FedEx). Document filed by Putnam Bank; Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund; Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund; Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund; Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund; City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System; City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan. (Scott, David)
May 9, 2019 Filing 181 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets, LLC. Document filed by RBC Capital Markets, LLC.(Owens, Richard)
May 9, 2019 Filing 180 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Royal Bank of Canada.(Owens, Richard)
May 9, 2019 Filing 179 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lilia Borislavova Vazova on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada. (Vazova, Lilia)
May 9, 2019 Filing 178 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Kent Yatter on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada. (Yatter, Douglas)
May 9, 2019 Filing 177 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard David Owens on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada. (Owens, Richard)
May 9, 2019 Filing 176 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG for Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC.(Kurtzberg, Joel)
May 9, 2019 Filing 175 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Beth Perlgut on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Perlgut, Lauren)
May 9, 2019 Filing 174 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Shawn Mintz on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Mintz, Adam)
May 9, 2019 Filing 173 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Michael Hall on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Hall, Jason)
May 9, 2019 Filing 172 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elai E. Katz on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Katz, Elai)
May 9, 2019 Filing 171 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel Laurence Kurtzberg on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Kurtzberg, Joel)
May 9, 2019 Filing 170 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Herbert Scott Washer on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Washer, Herbert)
May 9, 2019 Filing 169 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Demetri Brumis Blaisdell on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC. (Blaisdell, Demetri)
May 8, 2019 Filing 168 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays US LLC, Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC for Barclays Capital Inc.. Document filed by Barclays Capital Inc..(Schiller, Jonathan)
May 8, 2019 Filing 167 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC for Barclays Bank PLC. Document filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Schiller, Jonathan)
May 8, 2019 Filing 166 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Barclays PLC.(Schiller, Jonathan)
May 8, 2019 Filing 165 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leigh Mager Nathanson on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC. (Nathanson, Leigh)
May 8, 2019 Filing 164 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Emmanuel Duffy on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC. (Duffy, Christopher)
May 8, 2019 Filing 163 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan David Schiller on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC. (Schiller, Jonathan)
May 8, 2019 Filing 162 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UBS Americas Inc., Other Affiliate UBS AG, Other Affiliate UBS Americas Holding LLC for UBS Securities LLC; Corporate Parent no corporate parent and no publicly held coporation owns 10 percent or more of its stock for UBS Group AG; Corporate Parent UBS Group AG for UBS AG. Document filed by UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Securities LLC.(Stock, Eric)
May 8, 2019 Filing 161 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan James Levan on behalf of UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Securities LLC. (Levan, Ryan)
May 8, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jefferson Eliot Bell on behalf of UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Securities LLC. (Bell, Jefferson)
May 8, 2019 Filing 159 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Jonathan Stock on behalf of UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Securities LLC. (Stock, Eric)
May 7, 2019 Filing 158 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate RBS Group for National Westminster Bank PLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Scotland PLC; Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC. Document filed by National Westminster Bank PLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC.(Lesser, David)
May 7, 2019 Filing 157 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jamie Stephen Dycus on behalf of National Westminster Bank PLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC. (Dycus, Jamie)
May 7, 2019 Filing 156 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Sapir Lesser on behalf of National Westminster Bank PLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC. (Lesser, David)
May 7, 2019 Filing 155 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent SAS Rue La Boetie for Credit Agricole S.A.. Document filed by Credit Agricole S.A..(Neuhaus, Joseph)
May 7, 2019 Filing 154 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank for Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc.. Document filed by Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc..(Neuhaus, Joseph)
May 7, 2019 Filing 153 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Credit Agricole S.A. for Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank. Document filed by Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank.(Neuhaus, Joseph)
May 7, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Emanuel Neuhaus on behalf of Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc.. (Neuhaus, Joseph)
May 7, 2019 Filing 151 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG, Corporate Parent DB USA Corporation, Corporate Parent DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation for Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.; Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Deutsche Bank AG. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..(Karp, Brad)
May 7, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maxwell Arlie Halpern Kosman on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Kosman, Maxwell)
May 7, 2019 Filing 149 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hallie Suzanne Goldblatt on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Goldblatt, Hallie)
May 7, 2019 Filing 148 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Sombat Carey on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Carey, Jessica)
May 7, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brad Scott Karp on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Karp, Brad)
May 2, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Philip Devlin, III on behalf of MUFG SECURITIES AMERICAS INC.. (Devlin, Michael)
May 2, 2019 Filing 145 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth A Cassady on behalf of MUFG SECURITIES AMERICAS INC.. (Cassady, Elizabeth)
May 2, 2019 Filing 144 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. for MUFG SECURITIES AMERICAS INC.. Document filed by MUFG SECURITIES AMERICAS INC..(Viapiano, Christopher)
May 2, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Michael Viapiano on behalf of MUFG SECURITIES AMERICAS INC.. (Viapiano, Christopher)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows: 1. The Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Action shall be consolidated for pretrial purposes with the Putnam Bank Action and the City of Livonia Action, as shall be any Subsequent Action accepted as related by this Court (collectively, the "Consolidated Action"). 2. All filings in the Consolidated Action shall be made in docket 1:19-cv-00439 only and captioned as follows: IN RE: ICE LIBOR ANTITRUST LITIGATION, and as further set forth in this stipulation. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/2/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00439-GBD, 1:19-cv-02002-GBD(jwh)
May 2, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy Neda Vegari on behalf of BNP Paribas Securities Corp.. (Vegari, Amy)
May 2, 2019 Filing 140 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BNP Paribas for BNP Paribas Securities Corp.. Document filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp..(Goldberg, Joshua)
May 2, 2019 Filing 139 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Robert Vitullo on behalf of BNP Paribas Securities Corp.. (Vitullo, Jason)
May 2, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Aaron Goldberg on behalf of BNP Paribas Securities Corp.. (Goldberg, Joshua)
May 1, 2019 Filing 137 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. for ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc.. Document filed by ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc..(Hakki, Adam)
May 1, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John F. Cove, Jr on behalf of ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc.. (Cove, John)
May 1, 2019 Filing 135 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Societe Generale for SG Americas Securities, LLC. Document filed by SG Americas Securities, LLC, Societe Generale S.A..(Wolowitz, Steven)
May 1, 2019 Filing 134 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jerome Steven Fortinsky on behalf of ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc.. (Fortinsky, Jerome)
May 1, 2019 Filing 133 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Victoria Dumaresq Whitney on behalf of SG Americas Securities, LLC, Societe Generale S.A.. (Whitney, Victoria)
May 1, 2019 Filing 132 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Selim Hakki on behalf of ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc.. (Hakki, Adam)
May 1, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jonathan Calica on behalf of SG Americas Securities, LLC, Societe Generale S.A.. (Calica, Andrew)
May 1, 2019 Filing 130 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Henninger Simons Bullock on behalf of SG Americas Securities, LLC, Societe Generale S.A.. (Bullock, Henninger)
May 1, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Wolowitz on behalf of SG Americas Securities, LLC, Societe Generale S.A.. (Wolowitz, Steven)
May 1, 2019 Filing 128 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc., MUFG SECURITIES AMERICAS INC., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., National Westminster Bank PLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., Societe Generale S.A., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., The Norinchukin Bank, UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Securities LLC. (Mishkin, Paul)
May 1, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark David Villaverde on behalf of Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A.. (Villaverde, Mark)
May 1, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Charles Hora on behalf of Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A.. (Hora, Robert)
May 1, 2019 Filing 125 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A..(Gelfand, David)
May 1, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Robert Gelfand on behalf of Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A.. (Gelfand, David)
April 30, 2019 Filing 123 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Gluckow, Paul)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #121 Motion for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/29/2019) (ama)
April 25, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #121 MOTION for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
April 25, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #121 MOTION for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16763943.(Roellke, Jon)
April 25, 2019 Filing 121 MOTION for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jon R. Roellke in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Roellke, Jon)
April 24, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter J. Mardian on behalf of The Norinchukin Bank. (Mardian, Peter)
April 24, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan M. Unger on behalf of The Norinchukin Bank. (Unger, Alan)
April 24, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Andrew Paskowitz on behalf of The Norinchukin Bank. (Paskowitz, Thomas)
April 24, 2019 Filing 117 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Norinchukin Bank.(Stern, Andrew)
April 24, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew W. Stern on behalf of The Norinchukin Bank. (Stern, Andrew)
April 22, 2019 Filing 115 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings plc for HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. Document filed by HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc..(Marshall, Damien)
April 22, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew L. Chesley on behalf of HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Chesley, Andrew)
April 22, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Benjamin Andrew Fleming on behalf of Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc.. New Address: Hogan Lovells US LLP, 390 Madison Avenue, New York, New York, United States 10017, 212 918-3000. (Fleming, Benjamin)
April 22, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lisa Jean Fried on behalf of Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc.. New Address: Hogan Lovells US LLP, 390 Madison Avenue, New York, New York, United States 10017, 212 918-3000. (Fried, Lisa)
April 22, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Marc Joel Gottridge on behalf of Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc.. New Address: Hogan Lovells US LLP, 390 Madison Avenue, New York, New York, United States 10017, 212 918-3000. (Gottridge, Marc)
April 22, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Marc Joel Gottridge on behalf of Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc.. New Address: Hogan Lovells US LLP, 390 Madison Avenue, New York, New York, United States 10017, 212 918-3000. (Gottridge, Marc)
April 22, 2019 Filing 109 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The Norinchukin Bank waiver sent on 3/21/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
April 16, 2019 Filing 108 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate NB Holding Corporation for Bank of America N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc.. Document filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc..(Mishkin, Paul)
April 12, 2019 Filing 107 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc..(Schacter, Kenneth)
April 12, 2019 Filing 106 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation for Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd.. Document filed by Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd..(Schacter, Kenneth)
April 12, 2019 Filing 105 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc. for Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation. Document filed by Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation.(Schacter, Kenneth)
April 12, 2019 Filing 104 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Corporate Parent SMBC Americas Holdings, Inc. for SMBC Capital Markets, Inc.. Document filed by SMBC Capital Markets, Inc..(Schacter, Kenneth)
April 12, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Ian Schacter on behalf of SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc.. (Schacter, Kenneth)
April 4, 2019 Filing 102 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019. Service was made by Mail (UPS). Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
April 4, 2019 Filing 101 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. Credit Agricole S.A. served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019. Service was made by Mail (UPS). Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
April 3, 2019 Filing 100 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A. served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019. Service was made by Mail (USPS). Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 99 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Societe Generale S.A. served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. Service was accepted by John Bardakjy, Legal Department. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 98 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. UBS Group AG served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. Service was accepted by Sally Castro, Legal Department. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 97 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd. served on 3/14/2019, answer due 4/4/2019. Service was made by Mail (UPS). Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 96 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. UBS AG served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. Service was accepted by Sally Castro, Legal Department. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 95 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc. served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. Service was accepted by Jane Hutta, Assistant General Counsel. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 94 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. National Westminster Bank PLC served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. Service was made by Mail (UPS). Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 93 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. Service was accepted by Jane Hutta, Assistant General Counsel. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 92 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Service was made by Mail (UPS). Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 91 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. Royal Bank of Scotland PLC served on 3/14/2019, answer due 4/4/2019. Service was made by Mail (UPS). Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 90 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Royal Bank of Canada served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019. Service was accepted by Mary Hernandez, Client Care Advisor. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 89 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. Barclays Bank PLC served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Service was made by Mail (UPS). Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 88 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Deutsche Bank AG served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. Service was accepted by Diana Hui, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 87 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. Barclays PLC served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Service was made by Mail (UPS). Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 86 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. ICE Benchmark Administration Limited served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. Service was made by Mail (UPS). Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 85 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Credit Suisse AG served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Service Intake Clerk. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
March 5, 2019 Filing 84 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. SMBC Capital Markets, Inc. served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Service was accepted by Scott Diamond, Counsel. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
March 5, 2019 Filing 83 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. MUFG SECURITIES AMERICAS INC. served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Service was accepted by Winston Kitchingham, Legal Department. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
March 5, 2019 Filing 82 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Lloyds Securities Inc. served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. Service was accepted by Devora Wilson, Paralegal. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 27, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Andrew Fleming on behalf of Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc.. (Fleming, Benjamin)
February 27, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Jean Fried on behalf of Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc.. (Fried, Lisa)
February 27, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Joel Gottridge on behalf of Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc.. (Gottridge, Marc)
February 27, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Steven Carnevale on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Carnevale, Michael)
February 27, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Thomas Menitove on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Menitove, Jonathan)
February 27, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Sparks Bradley, Rachel)
February 27, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Isaac Martin Rethy on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Rethy, Isaac)
February 27, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Craig Turner on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Turner, Alan)
February 27, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Beth Forshaw on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Forshaw, Mary Beth)
February 27, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abram Jeremy Ellis on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Ellis, Abram)
February 27, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Christopher Gluckow on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Gluckow, Paul)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #66 Letter Requesting an Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints, filed by Barclays Capital Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., SG Americas Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Royal Bank of Canada, ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., Natwest Markets Securities Inc., Lloyds Securities Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICE Data Services, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., UBS Securities LLC. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/20/19) (yv)
February 19, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Wyatt Blakemore on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc.. (Blakemore, Patrick)
February 19, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Gabor Mehes on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc.. (Mehes, Adam)
February 19, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arthur J. Burke on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc.. (Burke, Arthur)
February 19, 2019 Filing 66 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Paul S. Mishkin dated February 19, 2019 re: Requesting an Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints. Document filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lloyds Securities Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., Natwest Markets Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, SG Americas Securities, LLC, UBS Securities LLC.(Mishkin, Paul)
February 19, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Steel Mishkin on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc.. (Mishkin, Paul)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF STEVEN M. JODLOWSKI granting #59 Motion for Steven M. Jodlowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/14/2019) (rjm)
February 13, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven M Jodlowski on behalf of City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Putnam Bank. (Jodlowski, Steven)
February 13, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Randi Dawn Bandman on behalf of City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Putnam Bank. (Bandman, Randi)
February 12, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joanna Christine Wright on behalf of HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Wright, Joanna)
February 12, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Damien Jerome Marshall on behalf of HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Marshall, Damien)
February 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #59 MOTION for Steven M. Jodlowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16331683. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for Steven M. Jodlowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16331683. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Putnam Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven M. Jodlowski in support thereof, #2 Exhibit A_Supreme Court of California Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jodlowski, Steven)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/9/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/8/2019) (jwh)
February 7, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
February 7, 2019 Filing 57 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Brad S. Karp dated February 7, 2019 re: Defendant Representation. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..(Karp, Brad)
February 6, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Joseph Coughlin on behalf of City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Putnam Bank. (Coughlin, Patrick)
February 6, 2019 Filing 55 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Bank of America Corporation served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by David Wallace, Financial Center Manager. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 6, 2019 Filing 54 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Bank of America N.A. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by David Wallace, Financial Center Manager. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 6, 2019 Filing 53 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #51 Letter, filed by Barclays Capital Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., SG Americas Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Royal Bank of Canada, ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., Natwest Markets Securities Inc., Lloyds Securities Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICE Data Services, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., UBS Securities LLC. ENDORSEMENT: I have spoken to Judge Buchwald. I will be keeping this case. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/6/2019) (mml)
February 6, 2019 Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from David R. Scott dated 02/06/2019 re: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Request to Relate Cases. Document filed by City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan, Putnam Bank.(Scott, David)
February 5, 2019 Filing 51 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Paul S. Mishkin dated February 5, 2019 re: Requesting that the Court treat the above-captioned action as related to the multidistrict litigation pending before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald, In re LIBOR-Based Financial Instruments Antitrust Litigation, No. 11-MD-2262 (NRB), and transfer this action to Judge Buchwald under S.D.N.Y. District Judge Rule 13(a)(1). Document filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lloyds Securities Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., Natwest Markets Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, SG Americas Securities, LLC, UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Judge Marrero Dated February 4, 2019)(Mishkin, Paul)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #46 Motion for Randall P. Ewing, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of Attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/5/2019) (mml)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #45 Motion for George A. Zelc to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of Attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/5/2019) (mml)
February 5, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Victor Marrero is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Jonathan D. Schiller dated 2/4/2019 re: We write to bring to your attention our firm's involvement and our continued representation of Barclays in the above-referenced litigation assigned to Your Honor, should service be effected, and as further specified in this letter. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by defendant Barclays as defined above. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/4/2019) (rjm)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Paul C. Gluckow dated 2/4/2019 re: Counsel for defendants in the above referenced matters pending before Your Honor write these matters allege that defendants improperly manipulated the determination of the USD LIBOR benchmark rate from February 2014 to the present. JPMorgan was served with the Putnam complaint last week. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the letter above submitted to the Court by defendant JPMorgan Chase. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/4/2019) (js)
February 4, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #45 MOTION for George A. Zelc to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16282663. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
February 4, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #46 MOTION for Randall P. Ewing, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16282990. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Randall P. Ewing, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16282990. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing from the Bars of the States of IL and FL, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting R.P. Ewing, Jr. Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Ewing, Randall)
February 1, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for George A. Zelc to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16282663. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing from the DC Bar and the Bar of the State of IL, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting G.A. Zelc Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Zelcs, George)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate these actions for pretrial purposes; and it is further ORDERED that all filings in connection with the consolidated action be docketed against the remaining lower numbered case, 19 Civ. 439; and it is finally ORDERED that the Clerk of Court close the referenced higher numbered case, 19 Civ. 965, as a separate action and remove it from the Court's docket SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/1/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00439-VM, 1:19-cv-00965-UA(rro)
February 1, 2019 Filing 43 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Natwest Markets Securities Inc. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Matthew White, Legal Associate. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 42 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. RBC Capital Markets, LLC served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Samantha Kimosa, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 41 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. SG Americas Securities, LLC served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Nora Dindyal, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 40 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. UBS Securities LLC served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Yalana Charles, Paralegal. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 39 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. HSBC Securities (USA) Inc. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Nora Dindyal, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 38 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Nora Dindyal, Service Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 37 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Diana Hui, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 36 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Grace Shentwu, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 35 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Natalie Grano,VP Litigation Counsel. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. BNP Paribas Securities Corp. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Theresa DeLace, Assistant VP Paralegals. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Barclays Capital Inc. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Alisa Benintendi, Legal Department. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. J.P. Morgan Securities LLC served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Nora Dindyal, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Nora Dindyal, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. JPMorgan Chase & Co. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Nora Dindyal, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Citigroup Global Markets Inc. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Larry U. Hines, VP Office of General Counsel. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Citibank, N.A. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Larry U. Hines, VP Office of General Counsel. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Citigroup Inc. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Larry U. Hines, VP Office of General Counsel. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Audry Bernard, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Doris Chau, Counsel. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. ICE Data Services, Inc. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Doris Chau, Counsel. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Pam Jordan, Registered Agent. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service was accepted by Pam Jordan, Registered Agent. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Scott, David)
January 31, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas J. Undlin on behalf of Putnam Bank. (Undlin, Thomas)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Thomas J. Undlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/28/2019) (js)
January 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Geoffrey Holmes Kozen on behalf of Putnam Bank. (Kozen, Geoffrey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stacey Paige Slaughter on behalf of Putnam Bank. (Slaughter, Stacey)
January 25, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Thomas J. Undlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16245282. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
January 25, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Thomas J. Undlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16245282. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas J. Undlin, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Undlin, Thomas)
January 23, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BNP Paribas SA, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc., MUFG Bank, Ltd., MUFG SECURITIES AMERICAS INC., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., National Westminster Bank PLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., Societe Generale S.A., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd., The Norinchukin Bank, UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Securities LLC. (dnh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., ICE Benchmark Administration Limited (f/k/a NYSE Euronext Rate Administration Limited), ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Barclays plc, Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., BNP Paribas SA, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Crdit Agricole S.A., Crdit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Crdit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Lloyds Bank plc, Lloyds Securities Inc., MUFG Bank, Ltd., The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd., Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., The Norinchukin Bank, Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Royal Bank of Canada, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc, Royal Bank of Scotland plc, National Westminster Bank plc, Natwest Markets Securities Inc. (f/k/a RBS Securities, Inc.), Socit Gnrale S.A., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., UBS Group AG, UBS AG, and UBS Securities LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A to Summons)(Scott, David)
January 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David R. Scott to RE-FILE Document No. #10 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; All of the parties selected in the docket entry are not listed on the summons pdf (The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd., Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc.) Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Michael Berezney on behalf of Putnam Bank. (Berezney, Steven)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael E. Klenov on behalf of Putnam Bank. (Klenov, Michael)
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Rochelson on behalf of Putnam Bank. (Rochelson, David)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hollis L. Salzman on behalf of Putnam Bank. (Salzman, Hollis)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., ICE Benchmark Administration Limited (f/k/a NYSE Euronext Rate Administration Limited), ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Barclays plc, Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., BNP Paribas SA, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Crdit Agricole S.A., Crdit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Crdit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Lloyds Bank plc, Lloyds Securities Inc., MUFG Bank, Ltd., The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd., Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., The Norinchukin Bank, Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Royal Bank of Canada, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc, Royal Bank of Scotland plc, National Westminster Bank plc, Natwest Markets Securities Inc. (f/k/a RBS Securities, Inc.), Socit Gnrale S.A., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., UBS Group AG, UBS AG, and UBS Securities LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Schedule A to Summons)(Scott, David) Modified on 1/22/2019 (dnh).
January 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David R. Scott to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the names of all parties for whom the summons is being requested must be entered on the docket entry text. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Kay Boardman on behalf of Putnam Bank. (Boardman, Thomas)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Deborah Clark-Weintraub on behalf of Putnam Bank. (Clark-Weintraub, Deborah)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda F. Lawrence on behalf of Putnam Bank. (Lawrence, Amanda)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Anthony Barile, III on behalf of Putnam Bank. (Barile, Peter)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to All Defendants, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Schedule A to Summons)(Scott, David) Modified on 1/17/2019 (pne).
January 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David R. Scott to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): docket entry must list party names as to whom the summons request is for. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
January 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
January 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
January 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David R. Scott. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
January 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David R. Scott. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Putnam Bank; ICE Benchmark Administration Limited; Natwest Markets Securities Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent PB Bancorp, Inc. for Putnam Bank. Document filed by Putnam Bank.(Scott, David)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Putnam Bank. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Schedule A to Summons)(Scott, David) Modified on 1/16/2019 (sj).
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attachment to civil-cover-sheet)(Scott, David)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNP Paribas SA, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICE Benchmark Administration Limited (f/k/a NYSE Euronext Rate Administration Limited), ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lloyds Bank PLC,, Lloyds Securities Inc., MUFG Bank, Ltd., MUFG SECURITIES AMERICAS INC., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., National Westminster Bank PLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc. (f/k/a RBS Securities, Inc.), RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., Societe Generale S.A., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc., The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd., The Norinchukin Bank, UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Securities LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16195550)Document filed by Putnam Bank.(Scott, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: ICE LIBOR ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyds Securities Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Jean Fried
Represented By: Marc Joel Gottridge
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc.
Represented By: Arthur J. Burke
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Represented By: Paul Steel Mishkin
Represented By: Patrick Wyatt Blakemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Isaac Martin Rethy
Represented By: Alan Craig Turner
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas Menitove
Represented By: Paul Christopher Gluckow
Represented By: Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Michael Steven Carnevale
Represented By: Abram Jeremy Ellis
Represented By: Mary Beth Forshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Scotland PLC
Represented By: Jamie Stephen Dycus
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Adam Shawn Mintz
Represented By: Lauren Beth Perlgut
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer
Represented By: Jason Michael Hall
Represented By: Elai E. Katz
Represented By: Joel Laurence Kurtzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Lev Louis Dassin
Represented By: Roger Allen Cooper
Represented By: Olivia Renensland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Societe Generale S.A.
Represented By: Steven Wolowitz
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Calica
Represented By: Henninger Simons Bullock
Represented By: Victoria Dumaresq Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Hallie Suzanne Goldblatt
Represented By: Jessica Sombat Carey
Represented By: Brad Scott Karp
Represented By: Maxwell Arlie Halpern Kosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jerome Steven Fortinsky
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Canada
Represented By: Lilia Borislavova Vazova
Represented By: Douglas Kent Yatter
Represented By: Richard David Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays PLC
Represented By: Demetri Brumis Blaisdell
Represented By: Jonathan David Schiller
Represented By: Christopher Emmanuel Duffy
Represented By: Leigh Mager Nathanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Demetri Brumis Blaisdell
Represented By: Jonathan David Schiller
Represented By: Christopher Emmanuel Duffy
Represented By: Leigh Mager Nathanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUFG Bank, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael Philip Devlin, III
Represented By: Elizabeth A Cassady
Represented By: Christopher Michael Viapiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Philip Devlin, III
Represented By: Elizabeth A Cassady
Represented By: Christopher Michael Viapiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth Ian Schacter
Represented By: Jon Randall Roellke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS AG
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Represented By: Jefferson Eliot Bell
Represented By: Ryan James Levan
Represented By: David Jarrett Arp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Lev Louis Dassin
Represented By: Roger Allen Cooper
Represented By: Olivia Renensland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Isaac Martin Rethy
Represented By: Alan Craig Turner
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas Menitove
Represented By: Paul Christopher Gluckow
Represented By: Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Michael Steven Carnevale
Represented By: Abram Jeremy Ellis
Represented By: Mary Beth Forshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Joanna Christine Wright
Represented By: Damien Jerome Marshall
Represented By: Andrew L. Chesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Represented By: Hallie Suzanne Goldblatt
Represented By: Jessica Sombat Carey
Represented By: Brad Scott Karp
Represented By: Maxwell Arlie Halpern Kosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Ian Schacter
Represented By: Jon Randall Roellke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Americas Securities, LLC
Represented By: Steven Wolowitz
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Calica
Represented By: Henninger Simons Bullock
Represented By: Victoria Dumaresq Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICE Benchmark Administration Limited (f/k/a NYSE Euronext Rate Administration Limited)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Represented By: Jefferson Eliot Bell
Represented By: Ryan James Levan
Represented By: David Jarrett Arp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyds Bank PLC,
Represented By: Lisa Jean Fried
Represented By: Marc Joel Gottridge
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natwest Markets Securities Inc. (f/k/a RBS Securities, Inc.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Nourse Gross
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Neuhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Joanna Christine Wright
Represented By: Damien Jerome Marshall
Represented By: Andrew L. Chesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC
Represented By: Jamie Stephen Dycus
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Agricole S.A.
Represented By: Alexander Nourse Gross
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Neuhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd.
Represented By: Kenneth Ian Schacter
Represented By: Jon Randall Roellke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A.
Represented By: Robert Charles Hora
Represented By: Mark David Villaverde
Represented By: David Robert Gelfand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercontinental Exchange, Inc.
Represented By: Jerome Steven Fortinsky
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Represented By: Amy Neda Vegari
Represented By: Jason Robert Vitullo
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMBC Capital Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Ian Schacter
Represented By: Jon Randall Roellke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank
Represented By: Alexander Nourse Gross
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Neuhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Westminster Bank PLC
Represented By: Jamie Stephen Dycus
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse AG
Represented By: Adam Shawn Mintz
Represented By: Lauren Beth Perlgut
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer
Represented By: Jason Michael Hall
Represented By: Elai E. Katz
Represented By: Joel Laurence Kurtzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Inc.
Represented By: Lev Louis Dassin
Represented By: Roger Allen Cooper
Represented By: Olivia Renensland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUFG SECURITIES AMERICAS INC.
Represented By: Michael Philip Devlin, III
Represented By: Elizabeth A Cassady
Represented By: Christopher Michael Viapiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings plc
Represented By: Joanna Christine Wright
Represented By: Damien Jerome Marshall
Represented By: Andrew L. Chesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Norinchukin Bank
Represented By: Peter J. Mardian
Represented By: Alan M. Unger
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Paskowitz
Represented By: Andrew W. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank PLC
Represented By: Joanna Christine Wright
Represented By: Damien Jerome Marshall
Represented By: Andrew L. Chesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Group AG
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Represented By: Jefferson Eliot Bell
Represented By: Ryan James Levan
Represented By: David Jarrett Arp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Arthur J. Burke
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Represented By: Paul Steel Mishkin
Represented By: Patrick Wyatt Blakemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Represented By: Demetri Brumis Blaisdell
Represented By: Jonathan David Schiller
Represented By: Christopher Emmanuel Duffy
Represented By: Leigh Mager Nathanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Group AG
Represented By: Adam Shawn Mintz
Represented By: Lauren Beth Perlgut
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer
Represented By: Jason Michael Hall
Represented By: Elai E. Katz
Represented By: Joel Laurence Kurtzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC
Represented By: Jerome Steven Fortinsky
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Arthur J. Burke
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Represented By: Paul Steel Mishkin
Represented By: Patrick Wyatt Blakemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Lilia Borislavova Vazova
Represented By: Douglas Kent Yatter
Represented By: Richard David Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICE Data Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jerome Steven Fortinsky
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Isaac Martin Rethy
Represented By: Alan Craig Turner
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas Menitove
Represented By: Paul Christopher Gluckow
Represented By: Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Michael Steven Carnevale
Represented By: Abram Jeremy Ellis
Represented By: Mary Beth Forshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natwest Markets Securities Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Stephen Dycus
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICE Benchmark Administration Limited
Represented By: Jerome Steven Fortinsky
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NatWest Markets Plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Putnam Bank
Represented By: David R. Scott
Represented By: Randi Dawn Bandman
Represented By: Michael E. Klenov
Represented By: Amanda F. Lawrence
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Stacey Paige Slaughter
Represented By: Steven M Jodlowski
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Coughlin
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Represented By: David Rochelson
Represented By: Hollis L. Salzman
Represented By: Steven Michael Berezney
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin
Represented By: Deborah Clark-Weintraub
Represented By: Geoffrey Holmes Kozen
Represented By: Thomas Kay Boardman
Represented By: Carol Lee O'Keefe
Represented By: Justin W Batten
Represented By: Michael Paul Srodoski
Represented By: Christian Levis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Randi Dawn Bandman
Represented By: David R. Scott
Represented By: Steven M Jodlowski
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Coughlin
Represented By: Christian Levis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: City of Livonia Retiree Health and Disability Benefits Plan
Represented By: Randi Dawn Bandman
Represented By: David R. Scott
Represented By: Steven M Jodlowski
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Coughlin
Represented By: Christian Levis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund
Represented By: David R. Scott
Represented By: Randi Dawn Bandman
Represented By: Amanda F. Lawrence
Represented By: Steven M Jodlowski
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Coughlin
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Represented By: Deborah Clark-Weintraub
Represented By: Thomas Kay Boardman
Represented By: Christian Levis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: David R. Scott
Represented By: Randi Dawn Bandman
Represented By: Amanda F. Lawrence
Represented By: Steven M Jodlowski
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Coughlin
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Represented By: Deborah Clark-Weintraub
Represented By: Thomas Kay Boardman
Represented By: Christian Levis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund
Represented By: David R. Scott
Represented By: Randi Dawn Bandman
Represented By: Amanda F. Lawrence
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Coughlin
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Represented By: Deborah Clark-Weintraub
Represented By: Thomas Kay Boardman
Represented By: Christian Levis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund
Represented By: David R. Scott
Represented By: Randi Dawn Bandman
Represented By: Amanda F. Lawrence
Represented By: Steven M Jodlowski
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Coughlin
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Represented By: Deborah Clark-Weintraub
Represented By: Thomas Kay Boardman
Represented By: Christian Levis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?