Cisse v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Pape Mady Cisse
Defendant: Ean Holdings LLC and United States Of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00614
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting in part #9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED in part. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for March 21, 2019, is adjourned to April 11, 2019, at 10:40 a.m. The Court does not ordinarily adjourn the initial conference pending an answer to the Complaint. Initial Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/11/2019) (mro)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Charles S. Jacob dated March 8, 2019. Document filed by United States Of America.(Jacob, Charles)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Salim Jacob on behalf of United States Of America. (Jacob, Charles)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Complaint. Document filed by Ean Holdings LLC.(Khrinenko, Peter)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/4/2019) (cf)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Ean Holdings LLC, United States Of America. Document filed by Pape Mady Cisse.(Nazrali, Rehan)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ean Holdings LLC, United States Of America. (pc)
January 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Rehan Nazrali to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
January 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
January 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
January 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Rehan Nazrali. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:2672mv; Nature of Suit code 360 (P.I.: Other); Dollar Demand $250,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:2671; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 350 (Motor Vehicle); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $250,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
January 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Rehan Nazrali. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, EAN HOLDINGS LLC, s/h/a ENTERPRISE RENTAL COMPANY. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and EAN HOLDINGS LLC s/h/a ENTERPRISE RENTAL COMPANY, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Pape Mady Cisse. (Nazrali, Rehan)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Nazrali, Rehan)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16222991)Document filed by Pape Mady Cisse.(Nazrali, Rehan) Modified on 1/23/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cisse v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ean Holdings LLC
Represented By: Peter M. Khrinenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Charles Salim Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pape Mady Cisse
Represented By: Rehan Nazrali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?