Romero et al v. Manhattan And Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority et al
Plaintiff: Diane Shields, Pamela Lee, Irene Thomas, Wajhee Mohammed, Lester Daniels, Janice Joe, Frank Estes, Todd J. Nelson, Alexander J. Matlosz, Gladis Joseph, Gerard N. Nardo, Amelia Lee, Andrew Jones, Edwin Romero, Manlung Lee, Lateya Daimage, Judith Charles, T. Milerson, Trevor Julian, Ada Iris Cuevas, Shanna Patterson, Gerard P. Cornet, Dexter H. Tyrrell, Norman Rubi, Tanya Brand-Jones, Arkadiy Grimberg, Johnny Jue, Jeanette Rivera, John Sciotto, Wai Aung, Christophe Blanchard, Benjamin James, Gregory Lau, Dorian Stewart, Aminata Charles, Howard G. Daley, Jr., Alexander Martin, Oswaldo Palomino, Donavon Simonette, Edwin Gutierrez, Shaoming Chang, Nithima Chakkrijratana, Roderick Mckrieth, Thomas Scourtos, Charles M. Frierson, David Callison, Frederick Laven, Barbara Brooks, Thomas Geraci, Tracey Henderson, Yvette Anderson, Khemraj Baichan, Wendy Tzuo, Lester Cumberbatch, Joanne Broome, Guy Taieb, Daniel Diaz, Stanley Andre, Raymond Dolan, Keith Best, Yolanda Tabb, Ruchita Acharya, Michael Quinn, Andrew Amir, Darleen Bell, Mr. Juan Hernandez, Jennifer Bello, Anvaer Ludmila, Dennis Donovan, Veronderlette Whitfield, David Carty, Avilio Mieses, Moshin Ahmad, Mahadeo Singh, Isaac F. Lapinig, Ebtesam Afify, Alexander Kalika, Donna Thompson, Sophia Roberts, Myrna Archer, Sukkyun Yoon, Basim Louis, Owen Hewitt, Denise Wellington, Robert Gonzalez, Jr., Gino J. Orologio, Angela Bonnette, Jithendra J. Yogarasa, Jin Qiang Luo, Gerard Max Roger, Loren Chauhan, P.O. Michael Castro, Jayson Payne, Jose Antonio Santiago, Neal Chernakoff, Dilwar Hassam, Noel Dalal, Terrance Russell, Theara Washington, Julian David Bautista-Rojas, Carlos Magno, Gary Desimone, John Stantyos, Paul Romano, Johanny Cruz, Wayne Munro, Gary Bacchus, Dawn M. Alexander, Ashraf Abdelkader, Feonyukkuen Mok, Jiasi Zhu, Beverlyn Richards, Fione Robe, Renee Griffith and Natasha Parris
Defendant: MTA Bus Company, MTA Headquarters and Manhattan And Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority
Case Number: 1:2019cv00694
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 4/29/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MTA Headquarters. (pne)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MTA Bus Company. (pne)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Manhattan And Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority. (pne)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MTA Headquarters, re: #6 Complaint,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Ashraf Abdelkader, Ruchita Acharya, Ebtesam Afify, Moshin Ahmad, Dawn M. Alexander, Andrew Amir, Yvette Anderson, Stanley Andre, Myrna Archer, Wai Aung, Gary Bacchus, Khemraj Baichan, Julian David Bautista-Rojas, Darleen Bell, Jennifer Bello, Keith Best, Christophe Blanchard, Angela Bonnette, Tanya Brand-Jones, Barbara Brooks, Joanne Broome, David Callison, David Carty, Michael Castro, Nithima Chakkrijratana, Shaoming Chang, Aminata Charles, Judith Charles, Loren Chauhan, Neal Chernakoff, Gerard P. Cornet, Johanny Cruz, Ada Iris Cuevas, Lester Cumberbatch, Lateya Daimage, Noel Dalal, Howard G. Daley, Jr., Lester Daniels, Gary Desimone, Daniel Diaz, Raymond Dolan, Dennis Donovan, Frank Estes, Charles M. Frierson, Thomas Geraci, Robert Gonzalez, Jr., Renee Griffith, Arkadiy Grimberg, Edwin Gutierrez, Dilwar Hassam, Tracey Henderson, Juan Hernandez, Owen Hewitt, Benjamin James, Janice Joe, Andrew Jones, Gladis Joseph, Johnny Jue, Trevor Julian, Alexander Kalika, Isaac F. Lapinig, Gregory Lau, Frederick Laven, Amelia Lee, Manlung Lee, Pamela Lee, Basim Louis, Anvaer Ludmila, Jin Qiang Luo, Carlos Magno, Alexander Martin, Alexander J. Matlosz, Roderick Mckrieth, Avilio Mieses, T. Milerson, Wajhee Mohammed, Feonyukkuen Mok, Wayne Munro, Gerard N. Nardo, Todd J. Nelson, Gino J. Orologio, Oswaldo Palomino, Natasha Parris, Shanna Patterson, Jayson Payne, Michael Quinn, Beverlyn Richards, Jeanette Rivera, Fione Robe, Sophia Roberts, Gerard Max Roger, Paul Romano, Edwin Romero, Norman Rubi, Terrance Russell, Jose Antonio Santiago, John Sciotto, Thomas Scourtos, Diane Shields, Donavon Simonette, Mahadeo Singh, John Stantyos, Dorian Stewart, Yolanda Tabb, Guy Taieb, Irene Thomas, Donna Thompson, Dexter H. Tyrrell, Wendy Tzuo, Theara Washington, Denise Wellington, Veronderlette Whitfield, Jithendra J. Yogarasa, Sukkyun Yoon, Jiasi Zhu. (Schwartz, Arthur)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MTA Bus Company, re: #6 Complaint,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Ashraf Abdelkader, Ruchita Acharya, Ebtesam Afify, Moshin Ahmad, Dawn M. Alexander, Andrew Amir, Yvette Anderson, Stanley Andre, Myrna Archer, Wai Aung, Gary Bacchus, Khemraj Baichan, Julian David Bautista-Rojas, Darleen Bell, Jennifer Bello, Keith Best, Christophe Blanchard, Angela Bonnette, Tanya Brand-Jones, Barbara Brooks, Joanne Broome, David Callison, David Carty, Michael Castro, Nithima Chakkrijratana, Shaoming Chang, Aminata Charles, Judith Charles, Loren Chauhan, Neal Chernakoff, Gerard P. Cornet, Johanny Cruz, Ada Iris Cuevas, Lester Cumberbatch, Lateya Daimage, Noel Dalal, Howard G. Daley, Jr., Lester Daniels, Gary Desimone, Daniel Diaz, Raymond Dolan, Dennis Donovan, Frank Estes, Charles M. Frierson, Thomas Geraci, Robert Gonzalez, Jr., Renee Griffith, Arkadiy Grimberg, Edwin Gutierrez, Dilwar Hassam, Tracey Henderson, Juan Hernandez, Owen Hewitt, Benjamin James, Janice Joe, Andrew Jones, Gladis Joseph, Johnny Jue, Trevor Julian, Alexander Kalika, Isaac F. Lapinig, Gregory Lau, Frederick Laven, Amelia Lee, Manlung Lee, Pamela Lee, Basim Louis, Anvaer Ludmila, Jin Qiang Luo, Carlos Magno, Alexander Martin, Alexander J. Matlosz, Roderick Mckrieth, Avilio Mieses, T. Milerson, Wajhee Mohammed, Feonyukkuen Mok, Wayne Munro, Gerard N. Nardo, Todd J. Nelson, Gino J. Orologio, Oswaldo Palomino, Natasha Parris, Shanna Patterson, Jayson Payne, Michael Quinn, Beverlyn Richards, Jeanette Rivera, Fione Robe, Sophia Roberts, Gerard Max Roger, Paul Romano, Edwin Romero, Norman Rubi, Terrance Russell, Jose Antonio Santiago, John Sciotto, Thomas Scourtos, Diane Shields, Donavon Simonette, Mahadeo Singh, John Stantyos, Dorian Stewart, Yolanda Tabb, Guy Taieb, Irene Thomas, Donna Thompson, Dexter H. Tyrrell, Wendy Tzuo, Theara Washington, Denise Wellington, Veronderlette Whitfield, Jithendra J. Yogarasa, Sukkyun Yoon, Jiasi Zhu. (Schwartz, Arthur)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority, re: #6 Complaint,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Ashraf Abdelkader, Ruchita Acharya, Ebtesam Afify, Moshin Ahmad, Dawn M. Alexander, Andrew Amir, Yvette Anderson, Stanley Andre, Myrna Archer, Wai Aung, Gary Bacchus, Khemraj Baichan, Julian David Bautista-Rojas, Darleen Bell, Jennifer Bello, Keith Best, Christophe Blanchard, Angela Bonnette, Tanya Brand-Jones, Barbara Brooks, Joanne Broome, David Callison, David Carty, Michael Castro, Nithima Chakkrijratana, Shaoming Chang, Aminata Charles, Judith Charles, Loren Chauhan, Neal Chernakoff, Gerard P. Cornet, Johanny Cruz, Ada Iris Cuevas, Lester Cumberbatch, Lateya Daimage, Noel Dalal, Howard G. Daley, Jr., Lester Daniels, Gary Desimone, Daniel Diaz, Raymond Dolan, Dennis Donovan, Frank Estes, Charles M. Frierson, Thomas Geraci, Robert Gonzalez, Jr., Renee Griffith, Arkadiy Grimberg, Edwin Gutierrez, Dilwar Hassam, Tracey Henderson, Juan Hernandez, Owen Hewitt, Benjamin James, Janice Joe, Andrew Jones, Gladis Joseph, Johnny Jue, Trevor Julian, Alexander Kalika, Isaac F. Lapinig, Gregory Lau, Frederick Laven, Amelia Lee, Manlung Lee, Pamela Lee, Basim Louis, Anvaer Ludmila, Jin Qiang Luo, Carlos Magno, Alexander Martin, Alexander J. Matlosz, Roderick Mckrieth, Avilio Mieses, T. Milerson, Wajhee Mohammed, Feonyukkuen Mok, Wayne Munro, Gerard N. Nardo, Todd J. Nelson, Gino J. Orologio, Oswaldo Palomino, Natasha Parris, Shanna Patterson, Jayson Payne, Michael Quinn, Beverlyn Richards, Jeanette Rivera, Fione Robe, Sophia Roberts, Gerard Max Roger, Paul Romano, Edwin Romero, Norman Rubi, Terrance Russell, Jose Antonio Santiago, John Sciotto, Thomas Scourtos, Diane Shields, Donavon Simonette, Mahadeo Singh, John Stantyos, Dorian Stewart, Yolanda Tabb, Guy Taieb, Irene Thomas, Donna Thompson, Dexter H. Tyrrell, Wendy Tzuo, Theara Washington, Denise Wellington, Veronderlette Whitfield, Jithendra J. Yogarasa, Sukkyun Yoon, Jiasi Zhu. (Schwartz, Arthur)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against MTA Bus Company, MTA Headquarters, Manhattan And Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority. Document filed by Benjamin James, Owen Hewitt, Fione Robe, Gary Desimone, Barbara Brooks, Mahadeo Singh, Wayne Munro, Wai Aung, Veronderlette Whitfield, Charles M. Frierson, Ebtesam Afify, Noel Dalal, John Stantyos, Johanny Cruz, Pamela Lee, Todd J. Nelson, Irene Thomas, Yolanda Tabb, Robert Gonzalez, Jr., Oswaldo Palomino, Christophe Blanchard, Beverlyn Richards, Tanya Brand-Jones, Loren Chauhan, Lester Daniels, John Sciotto, Myrna Archer, Shanna Patterson, Jennifer Bello, Angela Bonnette, Juan Hernandez, Joanne Broome, Andrew Jones, David Callison, Lateya Daimage, Wendy Tzuo, Carlos Magno, Renee Griffith, Michael Castro, Dexter H. Tyrrell, Avilio Mieses, Tracey Henderson, Gerard Max Roger, Edwin Gutierrez, Alexander J. Matlosz, Alexander Kalika, Sophia Roberts, Feonyukkuen Mok, Aminata Charles, Natasha Parris, Gregory Lau, David Carty, Gerard P. Cornet, Jithendra J. Yogarasa, T. Milerson, Michael Quinn, Gino J. Orologio, Dorian Stewart, Paul Romano, Basim Louis, Keith Best, Donna Thompson, Amelia Lee, Howard G. Daley, Jr., Jeanette Rivera, Gerard N. Nardo, Norman Rubi, Donavon Simonette, Terrance Russell, Denise Wellington, Lester Cumberbatch, Edwin Romero, Thomas Scourtos, Dilwar Hassam, Julian David Bautista-Rojas, Sukkyun Yoon, Ruchita Acharya, Frank Estes, Arkadiy Grimberg, Jiasi Zhu, Guy Taieb, Isaac F. Lapinig, Neal Chernakoff, Jose Antonio Santiago, Jayson Payne, Darleen Bell, Alexander Martin, Dennis Donovan, Diane Shields, Wajhee Mohammed, Theara Washington, Daniel Diaz, Frederick Laven, Anvaer Ludmila, Shaoming Chang, Raymond Dolan, Ada Iris Cuevas, Thomas Geraci, Stanley Andre, Judith Charles, Moshin Ahmad, Gladis Joseph, Nithima Chakkrijratana, Roderick Mckrieth, Yvette Anderson, Khemraj Baichan, Jin Qiang Luo, Gary Bacchus, Trevor Julian, Dawn M. Alexander, Ashraf Abdelkader, Janice Joe, Johnny Jue, Manlung Lee, Andrew Amir. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms, #2 Exhibit B - Job Postings)(Schwartz, Arthur)
January 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Arthur Z Schwartz to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
January 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
January 25, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
January 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Arthur Z Schwartz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code no selection;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:216;. (jgo)
January 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Arthur Z Schwartz to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
January 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Arthur Z Schwartz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: all of the plaintiffs. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error for David Carty, Norman Rubi, Julian David Bautista-Rojas, Tanya Brand-Jones; party text was omitted for all of the plaintiffs;. (jgo)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MTA Headquarters, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Ashraf Abdelkader, Ruchita Acharya, Ebtesam Afify, Moshin Ahmad, Dawn M. Alexander, Andrew Amir, Yvette Anderson, Stanley Andre, Myrna Archer, Wai Aung, Gary Bacchus, Khemraj Baichan, Darleen Bell, Jennifer Bello, Keith Best, Christophe Blanchard, Angela Bonnette, Barbara Brooks, Joanne Broome, David Callison, Carty Carty, Michael Castro, Nithima Chakkrijratana, Shaoming Chang, Aminata Charles, Judith Charles, Loren Chauhan, Neal Chernakoff, Gerard P. Cornet, Johanny Cruz, Ada Iris Cuevas, Lester Cumberbatch, Lateya Daimage, Noel Dalal, Howard G. Daley, Jr., Lester Daniels, Gary Desimone, Daniel Diaz, Raymond Dolan, Dennis Donovan, Frank Estes, Charles M. Frierson, Thomas Geraci, Robert Gonzalez, Jr., Renee Griffith, Arkadiy Grimberg, Edwin Gutierrez, Dilwar Hassam, Tracey Henderson, Juan Hernandez, Owen Hewitt, Benjamin James, Janice Joe, Andrew Jones, Gladis Joseph, Johnny Jue, David Bautista-Rojas Julian, Trevor Julian, Alexander Kalika, Isaac F. Lapinig, Gregory Lau, Frederick Laven, Amelia Lee, Manlung Lee, Pamela Lee, Basim Louis, Anvaer Ludmila, Jin Qiang Luo, Carlos Magno, Alexander Martin, Alexander J. Matlosz, Roderick Mckrieth, Avilio Mieses, T. Milerson, Wajhee Mohammed, Feonyukkuen Mok, Wayne Munro, Gerard N. Nardo, Todd J. Nelson, Gino J. Orologio, Oswaldo Palomino, Natasha Parris, Shanna Patterson, Jayson Payne, Michael Quinn, Beverlyn Richards, Jeanette Rivera, Fione Robe, Sophia Roberts, Gerard Max Roger, Paul Romano, Edwin Romero, Norman Rubin, Terrance Russell, Jose Antonio Santiago, John Sciotto, Thomas Scourtos, Diane Shields, Donavon Simonette, Mahadeo Singh, John Stantyos, Dorian Stewart, Yolanda Tabb, Guy Taieb, Brand-Jones Tanya, Irene Thomas, Donna Thompson, Dexter H. Tyrrell, Wendy Tzuo, Theara Washington, Denise Wellington, Veronderlette Whitfield, Jithendra J. Yogarasa, Sukkyun Yoon, Jiasi Zhu. (Schwartz, Arthur) Modified on 1/25/2019 (jgo).
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MTA Bus Company, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Ashraf Abdelkader, Ruchita Acharya, Ebtesam Afify, Moshin Ahmad, Dawn M. Alexander, Andrew Amir, Yvette Anderson, Stanley Andre, Myrna Archer, Wai Aung, Gary Bacchus, Khemraj Baichan, Darleen Bell, Jennifer Bello, Keith Best, Christophe Blanchard, Angela Bonnette, Barbara Brooks, Joanne Broome, David Callison, Carty Carty, Michael Castro, Nithima Chakkrijratana, Shaoming Chang, Aminata Charles, Judith Charles, Loren Chauhan, Neal Chernakoff, Gerard P. Cornet, Johanny Cruz, Ada Iris Cuevas, Lester Cumberbatch, Lateya Daimage, Noel Dalal, Howard G. Daley, Jr., Lester Daniels, Gary Desimone, Daniel Diaz, Raymond Dolan, Dennis Donovan, Frank Estes, Charles M. Frierson, Thomas Geraci, Robert Gonzalez, Jr., Renee Griffith, Arkadiy Grimberg, Edwin Gutierrez, Dilwar Hassam, Tracey Henderson, Juan Hernandez, Owen Hewitt, Benjamin James, Janice Joe, Andrew Jones, Gladis Joseph, Johnny Jue, David Bautista-Rojas Julian, Trevor Julian, Alexander Kalika, Isaac F. Lapinig, Gregory Lau, Frederick Laven, Amelia Lee, Manlung Lee, Pamela Lee, Basim Louis, Anvaer Ludmila, Jin Qiang Luo, Carlos Magno, Alexander Martin, Alexander J. Matlosz, Roderick Mckrieth, Avilio Mieses, T. Milerson, Wajhee Mohammed, Feonyukkuen Mok, Wayne Munro, Gerard N. Nardo, Todd J. Nelson, Gino J. Orologio, Oswaldo Palomino, Natasha Parris, Shanna Patterson, Jayson Payne, Michael Quinn, Beverlyn Richards, Jeanette Rivera, Fione Robe, Sophia Roberts, Gerard Max Roger, Paul Romano, Edwin Romero, Norman Rubin, Terrance Russell, Jose Antonio Santiago, John Sciotto, Thomas Scourtos, Diane Shields, Donavon Simonette, Mahadeo Singh, John Stantyos, Dorian Stewart, Yolanda Tabb, Guy Taieb, Brand-Jones Tanya, Irene Thomas, Donna Thompson, Dexter H. Tyrrell, Wendy Tzuo, Theara Washington, Denise Wellington, Veronderlette Whitfield, Jithendra J. Yogarasa, Sukkyun Yoon, Jiasi Zhu. (Schwartz, Arthur) Modified on 1/25/2019 (jgo).
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Ashraf Abdelkader, Ruchita Acharya, Ebtesam Afify, Moshin Ahmad, Dawn M. Alexander, Andrew Amir, Yvette Anderson, Stanley Andre, Myrna Archer, Wai Aung, Gary Bacchus, Khemraj Baichan, Darleen Bell, Jennifer Bello, Keith Best, Christophe Blanchard, Angela Bonnette, Barbara Brooks, Joanne Broome, David Callison, Carty Carty, Michael Castro, Nithima Chakkrijratana, Shaoming Chang, Aminata Charles, Judith Charles, Loren Chauhan, Neal Chernakoff, Gerard P. Cornet, Johanny Cruz, Ada Iris Cuevas, Lester Cumberbatch, Lateya Daimage, Noel Dalal, Howard G. Daley, Jr., Lester Daniels, Gary Desimone, Daniel Diaz, Raymond Dolan, Dennis Donovan, Frank Estes, Charles M. Frierson, Thomas Geraci, Robert Gonzalez, Jr., Renee Griffith, Arkadiy Grimberg, Edwin Gutierrez, Dilwar Hassam, Tracey Henderson, Juan Hernandez, Owen Hewitt, Benjamin James, Janice Joe, Andrew Jones, Gladis Joseph, Johnny Jue, David Bautista-Rojas Julian, Trevor Julian, Alexander Kalika, Isaac F. Lapinig, Gregory Lau, Frederick Laven, Amelia Lee, Manlung Lee, Pamela Lee, Basim Louis, Anvaer Ludmila, Jin Qiang Luo, Carlos Magno, Alexander Martin, Alexander J. Matlosz, Roderick Mckrieth, Avilio Mieses, T. Milerson, Wajhee Mohammed, Feonyukkuen Mok, Wayne Munro, Gerard N. Nardo, Todd J. Nelson, Gino J. Orologio, Oswaldo Palomino, Natasha Parris, Shanna Patterson, Jayson Payne, Michael Quinn, Beverlyn Richards, Jeanette Rivera, Fione Robe, Sophia Roberts, Gerard Max Roger, Paul Romano, Edwin Romero, Norman Rubin, Terrance Russell, Jose Antonio Santiago, John Sciotto, Thomas Scourtos, Diane Shields, Donavon Simonette, Mahadeo Singh, John Stantyos, Dorian Stewart, Yolanda Tabb, Guy Taieb, Brand-Jones Tanya, Irene Thomas, Donna Thompson, Dexter H. Tyrrell, Wendy Tzuo, Theara Washington, Denise Wellington, Veronderlette Whitfield, Jithendra J. Yogarasa, Sukkyun Yoon, Jiasi Zhu. (Schwartz, Arthur) Modified on 1/25/2019 (jgo).
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schwartz, Arthur)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against MTA Bus Company, MTA Headquarters, Manhattan And Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16235742)Document filed by Benjamin James, Owen Hewitt, Fione Robe, Gary Desimone, Barbara Brooks, Mahadeo Singh, Wayne Munro, Wai Aung, Veronderlette Whitfield, Charles M. Frierson, Ebtesam Afify, Noel Dalal, John Stantyos, Johanny Cruz, Pamela Lee, Todd J. Nelson, Irene Thomas, Yolanda Tabb, Robert Gonzalez, Jr., Oswaldo Palomino, Christophe Blanchard, Beverlyn Richards, Brand-Jones Tanya, Loren Chauhan, Lester Daniels, John Sciotto, Myrna Archer, Shanna Patterson, Jennifer Bello, Angela Bonnette, Juan Hernandez, Joanne Broome, Andrew Jones, David Callison, Lateya Daimage, Wendy Tzuo, Carlos Magno, Renee Griffith, Michael Castro, Dexter H. Tyrrell, Avilio Mieses, Tracey Henderson, Gerard Max Roger, Edwin Gutierrez, Alexander J. Matlosz, Alexander Kalika, Sophia Roberts, Feonyukkuen Mok, Aminata Charles, Natasha Parris, Gregory Lau, Carty Carty, Gerard P. Cornet, Jithendra J. Yogarasa, T. Milerson, Michael Quinn, Gino J. Orologio, Dorian Stewart, Paul Romano, Basim Louis, Keith Best, Donna Thompson, Amelia Lee, Howard G. Daley, Jr., Jeanette Rivera, Gerard N. Nardo, Norman Rubin, Donavon Simonette, Terrance Russell, Denise Wellington, Lester Cumberbatch, Edwin Romero, Thomas Scourtos, Dilwar Hassam, David Bautista-Rojas Julian, Sukkyun Yoon, Ruchita Acharya, Frank Estes, Arkadiy Grimberg, Jiasi Zhu, Guy Taieb, Isaac F. Lapinig, Neal Chernakoff, Jose Antonio Santiago, Jayson Payne, Darleen Bell, Alexander Martin, Dennis Donovan, Diane Shields, Wajhee Mohammed, Theara Washington, Daniel Diaz, Frederick Laven, Anvaer Ludmila, Shaoming Chang, Raymond Dolan, Ada Iris Cuevas, Thomas Geraci, Stanley Andre, Judith Charles, Moshin Ahmad, Gladis Joseph, Nithima Chakkrijratana, Roderick Mckrieth, Yvette Anderson, Khemraj Baichan, Jin Qiang Luo, Gary Bacchus, Trevor Julian, Dawn M. Alexander, Ashraf Abdelkader, Janice Joe, Johnny Jue, Manlung Lee, Andrew Amir. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms, #2 Exhibit B - Job Postings)(Schwartz, Arthur) Modified on 1/25/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero et al v. Manhattan And Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Shields
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Lee
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Thomas
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wajhee Mohammed
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Daniels
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Joe
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Estes
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd J. Nelson
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander J. Matlosz
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladis Joseph
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard N. Nardo
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Lee
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Jones
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Romero
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manlung Lee
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lateya Daimage
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Charles
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. Milerson
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Julian
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Iris Cuevas
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanna Patterson
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard P. Cornet
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter H. Tyrrell
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Rubi
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Brand-Jones
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkadiy Grimberg
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Jue
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Rivera
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sciotto
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wai Aung
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christophe Blanchard
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin James
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Lau
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorian Stewart
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aminata Charles
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard G. Daley, Jr.
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Martin
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oswaldo Palomino
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donavon Simonette
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Gutierrez
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaoming Chang
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nithima Chakkrijratana
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Mckrieth
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Scourtos
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles M. Frierson
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Callison
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Laven
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Brooks
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Geraci
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Henderson
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Anderson
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khemraj Baichan
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Tzuo
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Cumberbatch
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Broome
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Taieb
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Diaz
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Andre
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Dolan
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Best
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Tabb
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruchita Acharya
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Quinn
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Amir
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darleen Bell
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Juan Hernandez
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Bello
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anvaer Ludmila
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Donovan
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronderlette Whitfield
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Carty
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avilio Mieses
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moshin Ahmad
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahadeo Singh
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac F. Lapinig
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebtesam Afify
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Kalika
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Thompson
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Roberts
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrna Archer
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sukkyun Yoon
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basim Louis
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owen Hewitt
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Wellington
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gonzalez, Jr.
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gino J. Orologio
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Bonnette
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jithendra J. Yogarasa
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jin Qiang Luo
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Max Roger
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren Chauhan
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.O. Michael Castro
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayson Payne
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Santiago
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal Chernakoff
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dilwar Hassam
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Dalal
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Russell
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theara Washington
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian David Bautista-Rojas
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Magno
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Desimone
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Stantyos
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Romano
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johanny Cruz
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Munro
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Bacchus
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn M. Alexander
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashraf Abdelkader
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feonyukkuen Mok
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiasi Zhu
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverlyn Richards
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fione Robe
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Griffith
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Parris
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTA Bus Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTA Headquarters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manhattan And Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?