Mayor and City Council of Baltimore v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Police Retirement System of St. Louis and PUERTO RICO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES AND JUDICIARY RETIREMENT SYSTEMS ADMINISTRATION
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Barclays Bank PLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FTN Financial Securities Corp., Bank of America, N.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., First Tennessee Bank N.A., Unnamed Co-Conspirators and Jefferies Group LLC,
Case Number: 1:2019cv02900
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: The Motion of Jon R. Roellke for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captionedaction is granted.(And as further set forth in this Order). Attorney Jon Randall Roellke for Jefferies Group LLC,Jon Randall Roellke for Jefferies Group LLC admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/4/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-02900-JSR(jca)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #14 Motion for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/4/2019) (ne)
May 6, 2019 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Jefferies Financial Group Inc. for Jefferies Group LLC. Document filed by Jefferies Group LLC.(Schacter, Kenneth)
May 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Kenneth Ian Schacter to RE-FILE Document #13 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were only added to (19-cv-1704). Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). NOTE: YOU MUST SELECT THE FILER FOR EACH INDIVIDUAL CASE. (lb)
April 24, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (15 in 1:19-cv-02900-JSR, 45 in 1:19-cv-02715-JSR, 111 in 1:19-cv-01796-JSR, 155 in 1:19-cv-01704-JSR) MOTION for Christina D. Saler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16758540. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-01796-JSR, 1:19-cv-02715-JSR, 1:19-cv-02900-JSR(jc)
April 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Christina D. Saler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16758540. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dallas Area Rapid Transit Employees Defined Benefit Retirement Plan and Trust, Sheet Metal Workers Local 19 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-01796-JSR, 1:19-cv-02715-JSR, 1:19-cv-02900-JSR(Saler, Christina)
April 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16750411. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jefferies Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jon R. Roellke in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - Massachusetts, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia, #4 Exhibit D - [Proposed] Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR et al.(Roellke, Jon)
April 22, 2019 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Jefferies Financial Group Inc. for Jefferies Group LLC,. Document filed by Jefferies Group LLC,.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-02900-JSR(Schacter, Kenneth) Modified on 5/6/2019 (lb).
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Ian Schacter on behalf of Jefferies Group LLC,. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-02900-JSR(Schacter, Kenneth)
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian A. Herman on behalf of Jefferies Group LLC,. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-02900-JSR(Herman, Brian)
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jawad B. Muaddi on behalf of Jefferies Group LLC,. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-02900-JSR(Muaddi, Jawad)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of In Support of Motion of Robbins Geller and Quinn Emmanuel for Appointment as Co-Lead Counsel. Document filed by Police Retirement System of St. Louis, PUERTO RICO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES AND JUDICIARY RETIREMENT SYSTEMS ADMINISTRATION. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR et al.(Twersky, Mitchell)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. On consent of all parties, and in accordance with the Court's oral ruling from the bench, these cases are hereby consolidated for all purposes under the title "In re GSE Bonds Antitrust Litigation" and bearing the case number 19-cv-1704. All documents relating to these cases must be filed under the consolidated docket number. If a particular document relates only to a particular case or cases, that should be indicated in the heading. Counsel may, if they wish, also file documents on the individual dockets, so long as the documents are filed on the consolidated docket as well. Motions for the appointment of lead counsel must be filed by April 9, 2019. Any opposition is due by April 16, 2019. The Court will hold a hearing regarding the appointment of lead counsel on April 23, 2019 at 3:00pm, and will issue a ruling by May 1, 2019. The consolidated trial of these cases will begin on May 4, 2020. Following the appointment of lead counsel, the parties should confer and prepare, preferably jointly but otherwise separately, a proposed scheduling order governing discovery, motion practice, and all other pre-trial matters. The proposed scheduling order(s) should be submitted to the Court no later than May 8, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 4/9/2019. Responses due by 4/16/2019. Oral Argument set for 4/23/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff). (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR et al. (rjm)
April 3, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:19-cv-01704-JSR. (rjm)
April 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
April 3, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
April 3, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-01704-JSR. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arun Srinivas Subramanian on behalf of Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Subramanian, Arun)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth D. Ard on behalf of Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Ard, Seth)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie N. Spies on behalf of Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Spies, Stephanie)
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., FTN Financial Securities Corp., First Tennessee Bank N.A., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jefferies Group LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Unnamed Co-Conspirators. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore.(Carmody, William)
April 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jed S. Rakoff as possibly related to 1:19-cv-01704-JSR. (dnh)
April 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
April 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
April 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney William Christopher Carmody to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add party Unnamed Co-conspirators. Due to the omitted party all of the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-01704-JSR. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore.(Carmody, William)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Carmody, William)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., FTN Financial Securities Corp., First Tennessee Bank N.A., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jefferies Group LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16603540)Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore.(Carmody, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies Group LLC
Represented By: Jon Randall Roellke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FTN Financial Securities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Tennessee Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed Co-Conspirators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies Group LLC,
Represented By: Jon Randall Roellke
Represented By: Jawad B. Muaddi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Represented By: William Christopher Carmody
Represented By: Arun Srinivas Subramanian
Represented By: Seth D. Ard
Represented By: Stephanie N. Spies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Police Retirement System of St. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUERTO RICO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES AND JUDICIARY RETIREMENT SYSTEMS ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?