Kaye v. Avon Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Kaye and Victoria Josephine Kaye
Defendant: PFizer Inc.,, The Proctor & Gamble Company, Macys, Inc., Chanel, Coty, Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc., and as successor in interest to Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc., Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc., Revlon, Inc., Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Chanel Inc, Avon Products, Inc., Coty Inc., Brenntag North America, Inc., Glaxosmithkline, LLC, Chanel Co., Chanel, Inc., Coty International, Inc., Bloomingdale's, Inc. and Mineral and Pigment Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06490
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. Document filed by Revlon, Inc.. (McCann, Timothy)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 190165-19..Document filed by Revlon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Summons and Complaint)(McCann, Timothy)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCann, Timothy)
July 17, 2019 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1ZE22E532210026759 on 7/19/2019. (ne)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT ORDER TO REMAND TO STATE COURT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that removal under 28 U.S.C. 1446(b)(2)(a) was not effectuated, and this matter is hereby remanded back to State Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/17/2019) (ne) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Daniel J. Woodard dated July 17, 2019 re: Proposed Consent Order To Remand. Document filed by Victoria Josephine Kaye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Order To Remand)(Woodard, Daniel)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel John Woodard on behalf of Victoria Josephine Kaye. (Woodard, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
July 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Timothy M. McCann to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil cover sheet was not signed. (pc)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Timothy M. McCann. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Timothy M. McCann to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add Bloomingdale's, Inc. to CM ECF; Notice of Removal exhibits must be labeled and filed as attachments to the notice of removal pursuant to ECF Filing Rule 13.3. They cannot be labeled "Exhibit A, Exhibit B, etc". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Timothy M. McCann. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Victoria Kaye, Revlon, Inc., Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Chanel, Coty, Glaxosmithkline, LLC, Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc., and as successor in interest to Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc., PFizer Inc.,, The Proctor & Gamble Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCann, Timothy) Modified on 7/15/2019 (pc).
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Notice of Appearance, Answer to Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, and Certificate of Service served on Victoria J. Kaye on 7/12/2019. Document filed by Revlon, Inc.. (McCann, Timothy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against Victoria Kaye. Document filed by Revlon, Inc..(McCann, Timothy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Revlon, Inc. for Revlon, Inc.. Document filed by Revlon, Inc..(McCann, Timothy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy M. McCann on behalf of Revlon, Inc.. (McCann, Timothy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - EXHIBITS NOT CLEARLY TITLED - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 190165-19. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17235219).Document filed by Revlon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McCann, Timothy) Modified on 7/15/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaye v. Avon Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFizer Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Proctor & Gamble Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macys, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chanel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc., and as successor in interest to Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revlon, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy M. McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chanel Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avon Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coty Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glaxosmithkline, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chanel Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chanel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coty International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomingdale's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mineral and Pigment Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Kaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Josephine Kaye
Represented By: Daniel John Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?