Veder v. United States of America
Plaintiff: David Veder
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv06662
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332au
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States Of America.(Cowart, Brandon)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brandon Herbert Cowart on behalf of United States Of America. (Cowart, Brandon)
July 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sjo)
July 17, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
July 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
July 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Eastern; Case Number: 1:19-cv-02337. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER, The United States has moved to transfer this action to the Southern District of New York and requests an extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint. (Mot., ECF No. 6). Although the Court directed plaintiff to respond to the motion on or before July 12, 2019, (Order, dated July 2,2019), he did not comply with this order. For the reasons that follow, the motion is granted in its entirety, and this action is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York. The provision of Local Civil Rule 83.1 that provides for a seven-day delay in the transfer of a case is waived. So Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 7/15/2019. Case transferred to Southern District of New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent via CM/ECF. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Lee, Tiffeny). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff shall respond to #6 defendant's motion on or before July 12, 2019. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 7/2/2019. (Siegel, Max) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Transfer Venue by United States of America. (Balaban, Rachel). Added MOTION to Change Venue on 7/15/2019 (Lee, Tiffeny). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by David Veder (Morrison, Eric) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
May 1, 2019 SECOND NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM). Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions in *** NY-E DIVISION OF BUSINESS RULE 50.1(d)(2) and CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY *** section on the second page. This document can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
April 23, 2019 NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM). Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions in *** NY-E DIVISION OF BUSINESS RULE 50.1(d)(2) and CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY *** section on the second page. This document can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by david veder (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Morrison, Eric) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11406647 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by david veder. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet) (Morrison, Eric) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veder v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Veder
Represented By: Eric H. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Rachel G. Balaban
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?