Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC et al v. Ambac Assurance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sill Housing, LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP, Riley Communities LLC, AETC Housing LP, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC and Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC
Defendant: Danny Ray, Chetan Marfatia, AMBAC Assurance Corporation, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies & Company Inc. and Jefferies L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv09193
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #308 Letter filed by Chetan Marfatia, AMBAC Assurance Corporation. ENDORSEMENT: The application is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/18/2019) (jca)
December 17, 2019 Filing 309 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Akchin on behalf of Chetan Marfatia. (Akchin, Sean)
December 11, 2019 Filing 308 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Michael B. Carlinsky dated December 11, 2019 re: Kirkland Limited Withdrawal #301 . Document filed by AMBAC Assurance Corporation, Chetan Marfatia.(Carlinsky, Michael)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #305 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered on this the 10th dayof December, 2019. (Attorney Melinda Eades LeMoine and Justin Paul Raphael terminated.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/10/2019) (jwh)
December 6, 2019 Filing 306 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Myer Sanderson on behalf of AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Sanderson, Joseph)
December 4, 2019 Filing 305 MOTION for Justin Paul Raphael to Withdraw as Attorney Motion of Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP To Withdraw As Counsel For The Jefferies Defendants. Document filed by Jefferies & Company Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies L.L.C., Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc..(Raphael, Justin)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER terminating #275 LETTER MOTION for Conference Letter Requesting Status Conference On Behalf Of Defendants. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' answers are due seven days after this Court issues a decision concerning Defendants' motions for reconsideration (Dkt. Nos. 268, 269, 271, 273) concerning the Northern District of California's September 26, 2019 Order (Dkt. No. 266). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion. (Dkt. No. 275). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/20/2019) (jca)
November 12, 2019 Filing 303 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Fleming on behalf of AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Fleming, William)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 302 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FOR LIMITED PURPOSE AND FOR THE SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL granting #301 Motion to Substitute Attorney; granting #301 Motion to Withdraw. Added attorney George Robert Gage, Jr,William B. Fleming for AETC Housing LP,George Robert Gage, Jr,William B. Fleming for AMC West Housing LP,George Robert Gage, Jr,William B. Fleming for Bragg Communities LLC,George Robert Gage, Jr,William B. Fleming for Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP,George Robert Gage, Jr,William B. Fleming for Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP,George Robert Gage, Jr,William B. Fleming for Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC,George Robert Gage, Jr,William B. Fleming for Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC,George Robert Gage, Jr,William B. Fleming for Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC,George Robert Gage, Jr,William B. Fleming for Lackland Family Housing, LLC,George Robert Gage, Jr,William B. Fleming for Meade Communities LLC,George Robert Gage, Jr,William B. Fleming for Monterey Bay Land, LLC,George Robert Gage, Jr,William B. Fleming for Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC,George Robert Gage, Jr,William B. Fleming for Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC,George Robert Gage, Jr,William B. Fleming for Riley Communities LLC,George Robert Gage, Jr,William B. Fleming for Rucker Communities, LLC,George Robert Gage, Jr,William B. Fleming for Sill Housing, LLC,George Robert Gage, Jr,William B. Fleming for Stewart Hunter Housing LLC,George Robert Gage, Jr,William B. Fleming for Vandenberg Housing LP. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED on this the 12th day of November, 2019. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/12/2019) (jca)
November 8, 2019 Filing 301 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Kirkland & Ellis LLP for the limited purpose of the prosecution of their claims against Jefferies, New Attorney: Gage Spencer & Fleming LLP ., MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Limited Purpose and For Substiution of Counsel. Document filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP.(Welch, Donna)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #299 MOTION for Steven G. Madison to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel shall immediately forward the Pro Hae Vice fee to the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/7/2019) (jca) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
November 4, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #299 MOTION for Steven G. Madison to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $200.00, Receipt No. ANYSDC-17837704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 1, 2019 Filing 299 MOTION for Steven G. Madison to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $200.00, Receipt No. ANYSDC-17837704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AMBAC Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven G. Madison In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Madison, Steven)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule will apply to Defendants' Answers: 1. Defendants Answers are due on December 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. AMBAC Assurance Corporation answer due 12/4/2019; Jefferies & Company Inc. answer due 12/4/2019; Jefferies Group LLC answer due 12/4/2019; Jefferies L.L.C. answer due 12/4/2019; Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc. answer due 12/4/2019; Chetan Marfatia answer due 12/4/2019; Danny Ray answer due 12/4/2019. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/1/2019) (jca)
October 31, 2019 Filing 297 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #271 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #261 Utility - Miscellaneous, Reconsideration of the Northern District of California's September 26, 2019 Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. . Document filed by Danny Ray. (Brodsky, Reed)
October 31, 2019 Filing 296 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #273 MOTION to Vacate #261 Utility - Miscellaneous, MOTION TO VACATE THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIAS SEPTEMBER 26, 2019 RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. . Document filed by AMBAC Assurance Corporation. (Carlinsky, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 295 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Scott S. Balber dated October 31, 2019 re: Request for Oral Argument on Motions for Reconsideration. Document filed by Jefferies & Company Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies L.L.C., Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc..(Balber, Scott)
October 31, 2019 Filing 294 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #269 MOTION for Reconsideration . . Document filed by Jefferies & Company Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies L.L.C., Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Balber, Scott)
October 31, 2019 Filing 293 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #268 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #266 Order, . MOTION to Vacate #266 Order, of Transferor Court Entered Absent Personal Jurisdiction. . Document filed by Chetan Marfatia. (Goldberg, David)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #284 Motion for Benjamin T. Kurtz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/29/2019) (ama)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #283 MOTION for Donna M. Welch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/29/2019) (jca)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #285 MOTION for Yates M. French to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/29/2019) (jca)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #282 Motion for Jeffrey L. Willian to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/29/2019) (jwh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 288 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Steven G. Madison to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17837704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AMBAC Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Steven G. Madison in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit 1 to Steven G, Madison Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order for Admission)(Madison, Steven) Modified on 10/25/2019 (wb).
October 25, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #288 MOTION for Steven G. Madison to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17837704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting #279 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The application is granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/24/19) (yv)
October 24, 2019 Filing 286 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #268 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #266 Order, . MOTION to Vacate #266 Order, of Transferor Court Entered Absent Personal Jurisdiction., #269 MOTION for Reconsideration ., #271 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #261 Utility - Miscellaneous, Reconsideration of the Northern District of California's September 26, 2019 Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. . Document filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Bowen, Lamina)
October 24, 2019 Filing 285 MOTION for Yates M. French to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Yates M. French in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(French, Yates)
October 24, 2019 Filing 284 MOTION for Benjamin T. Kurtz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17829467. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Benjamin T. Kurtz in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurtz, Benjamin)
October 24, 2019 Filing 283 MOTION for Donna M. Welch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17829424. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Donna M. Welch in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Welch, Donna)
October 24, 2019 Filing 282 MOTION for Jeffrey L. Willian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey L. Willian in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Willian P C, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2019 Filing 281 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Anne Champion dated October 24, 2019 re: response to Plaintiffs' October 23, 2019 letter [Dkt. 280]. Document filed by Danny Ray.(Champion, Anne)
October 24, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #282 MOTION for Jeffrey L. Willian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-17828976, paid on 10/24/2019. (wb)
October 24, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #282 MOTION for Jeffrey L. Willian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #283 MOTION for Donna M. Welch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17829424. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 24, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #284 MOTION for Benjamin T. Kurtz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17829467. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
October 24, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #285 MOTION for Yates M. French to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-17829535, paid on 10/24/2019. (wb)
October 24, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #285 MOTION for Yates M. French to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 23, 2019 Filing 280 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Lamina Bowen dated October 23, 2019 re: Response to Defendants' October 22, 2019 Letter. Document filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP.(Bowen, Lamina)
October 22, 2019 Filing 279 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Omnibus Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Lamina Bowen dated October 22, 2019. Document filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP.(Bowen, Lamina)
October 22, 2019 Filing 278 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lamina E Bowen on behalf of AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Bowen, Lamina)
October 22, 2019 Filing 277 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Anne Champion dated October 22, 2019 re: Extension of Time to Respond. Document filed by Danny Ray.(Champion, Anne)
October 11, 2019 Filing 276 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Paul Jones on behalf of Jefferies & Company Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies L.L.C., Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 275 LETTER MOTION for Conference Letter Requesting Status Conference On Behalf Of Defendants addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Michael B. Carlinsky dated October 10, 2019. Document filed by AMBAC Assurance Corporation.(Carlinsky, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 274 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #273 MOTION to Vacate #261 Utility - Miscellaneous, MOTION TO VACATE THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIAS SEPTEMBER 26, 2019 RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. . Document filed by AMBAC Assurance Corporation. (Carlinsky, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 273 MOTION to Vacate #261 Utility - Miscellaneous, MOTION TO VACATE THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIAS SEPTEMBER 26, 2019 RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. Document filed by AMBAC Assurance Corporation.(Carlinsky, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 272 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #271 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #261 Utility - Miscellaneous, Reconsideration of the Northern District of California's September 26, 2019 Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. . Document filed by Danny Ray. (Brodsky, Reed)
October 10, 2019 Filing 271 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #261 Utility - Miscellaneous, Reconsideration of the Northern District of California's September 26, 2019 Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Danny Ray.(Brodsky, Reed)
October 10, 2019 Filing 270 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #269 MOTION for Reconsideration . . Document filed by Jefferies & Company Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies L.L.C., Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Balber, Scott)
October 10, 2019 Filing 269 MOTION for Reconsideration . Document filed by Jefferies & Company Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies L.L.C., Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc..(Balber, Scott)
October 10, 2019 Filing 268 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #266 Order, ., MOTION to Vacate #266 Order, of Transferor Court Entered Absent Personal Jurisdiction. Document filed by Chetan Marfatia. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion)(Goldberg, David)
October 4, 2019 Filing 267 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Northern; Case Number: 5:17-cv-04992. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
October 4, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
October 4, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
October 4, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sjo)
October 4, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER DENYING #223 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; SUA SPONTE RECONSIDERING PRIOR ORDER DENYING MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK; AND GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/26/2019. (This is the unredacted version of the sealed document filed on 9/26/2019 at #261 ). (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO FILE ORDER ON PUBLIC DOCKET; LIFTING STAY; AND ORDERING CLERK TO EFFECT TRANSFER OF CASE TO SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/3/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 264 STIPULATION Regarding Redactions to the Court's Order of September 26, 2019 filed by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 10/3/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 263 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Melinda Eades LeMoine Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Molly K. Priedeman (LeMoine, Melinda) (Filed on 10/2/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER STAYING TRANSFER TO THE DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK; AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT STIPULATED PROPOSED REDACTIONS TO THE COURT'S ORDER OF SEPTEMBER 26, 2019 ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/26/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; SUA SPONTE RECONSIDERING PRIOR ORDER DENYING MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK; AND GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER DENYING #258 DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION SEEKING STAY OF DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF THEIR MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/5/2019.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 259 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #258 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Stay of Discovery ) filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 8/12/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 258 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Stay of Discovery filed by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. Responses due by 8/12/2019. (O'Donnell, John) (Filed on 8/7/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 257 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-18-19, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #252 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2019. (Related documents(s) #252 ) (lasS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 256 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Redacted Complaint (per ECF 247) against All Defendants. Filed byPicerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, AMC West Housing LP, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Bragg Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, AETC Housing LP, Sill Housing, LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Riley Communities LLC. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 7/22/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 255 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/18/19 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Chetan Marfatia, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Denver, Zachary) (Filed on 7/22/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 254 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/18/2019 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Ambac Assurance Corporation, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Mills, Thomas) (Filed on 7/19/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 253 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/18/2019 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 7/19/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 252 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on July 18, 2019 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc., for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 7/19/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 251 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 7/18/2019 re #223 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Danny Ray, Chetan Marfatia, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Ambac Assurance Corporation, Jefferies & Company, Inc.A forthcoming Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the hearing. Total Time in Court: 2:23 (9:37 - 12:15). Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney: Jeffrey Willian, Donna Welch. Defendant Attorney: Anne Marie Champion, Scott Balber, Steven Madison, Zachary Denver. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/18/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 250 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Priedeman (Priedeman, Molly) (Filed on 7/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 249 EXHIBITS re #231 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Versions of ECF 233, 234, and 236 per ECF 248 filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Supplement [Unredacted ECF 233] per [ECF 248], #2 Supplement [Unredacted ECF 234] per [ECF 248], #3 Supplement [Unredacted ECF 236] per [ECF 248])(Related document(s) #231 ) (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 7/12/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE UNREDACTED VERSIONS OF #233 , #234 , #236 OPPOSITION BRIEFS NOT LATER THAN 4:00 PM ON FRIDAY, JULY 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/11/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #210 , #231 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/11/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER GRANTING #240 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/2/2019.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 245 Brief re #224 Brief Supplemental Reply of Defendant Dan Ray in Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byDanny Ray. (Related document(s) #224 ) (Champion, Anne) (Filed on 5/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 244 Brief re #225 Supplemental Brief Supplemental Reply of Defendant Chetan Marfatia in Support of His Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed byChetan Marfatia. (Related document(s) #225 ) (Goldberg, David) (Filed on 5/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 243 Brief re #228 Brief Defendant Ambac's Supplemental Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byAmbac Assurance Corporation. (Related document(s) #228 ) (Madison, Steven) (Filed on 5/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 242 Brief re #227 Brief, Supplemental Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed byJefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Related document(s) #227 ) (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 5/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 241 REPLY (re #223 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) Defendants' Joint Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byAmbac Assurance Corporation, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc., Chetan Marfatia, Danny Ray. (Madison, Steven) (Filed on 5/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 240 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13349985.) filed by Chetan Marfatia. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Denver, Zachary) (Filed on 5/15/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER GRANTING #238 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re attorney Michael B. Carlinsky). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/10/2019.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 238 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michael B. Carlinsky ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13332742.) filed by Ambac Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Carlinsky, Michael) (Filed on 5/9/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 237 Declaration in Support of #231 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Related document(s) #231 ) (O'Donnell, John) (Filed on 4/19/2019) Modified on 4/19/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 236 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #223 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 4/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 235 Brief re #227 Brief, in Opposition to Jefferies' Supplemental Motion to Dismiss filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Related document(s) #227 ) (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 4/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 234 Brief re #225 Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendant C. Marfatia's Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of His Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Related document(s) #225 ) (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 4/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 233 Brief re #228 Brief in Opposition to Ambac's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Related document(s) #228 ) (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 4/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 232 Brief re #224 Brief in Opposition to Defendant Danny Ray's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #224 ) (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 4/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 231 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant D. Ray's Motion to Dismiss, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant D. Ray's Motion to Dismiss, #5 Redacted Version of T. Noonan, Esq. in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss, #6 Unredacted Version of T. Noonan, Esq. in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss)(Welch, Donna) (Filed on 4/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER RE #222 JOINT/STIPULATED MOTION TO SET HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/21/2019.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 229 Declaration in Support of #227 Brief, #223 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byJefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #227 , #223 ) (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 2/15/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 228 Brief re #223 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Supplemental Brief filed byAmbac Assurance Corporation. (Related document(s) #223 ) (Madison, Steven) (Filed on 2/15/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 227 Brief re #223 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byJefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Related document(s) #223 ) (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 2/15/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 226 Declaration of John J. O'Donnell in Support of #223 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byAmbac Assurance Corporation, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc., Chetan Marfatia, Danny Ray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18)(Related document(s) #223 ) (Madison, Steven) (Filed on 2/15/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 225 Supplemental Brief re #223 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byChetan Marfatia. (Related document(s) #223 ) (Goldberg, David) (Filed on 2/15/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 224 Brief re #223 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byDanny Ray. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Dan Ray)(Related document(s) #223 ) (Champion, Anne) (Filed on 2/15/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 223 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Ambac Assurance Corporation, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc., Chetan Marfatia, Danny Ray. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 4/16/2019. Replies due by 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Madison, Steven) (Filed on 2/15/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 222 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Set the Earliest Possible Hearing Date for Oral Argument on Defendants' Forthcoming Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Chetan Marfatia. Responses due by 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goldberg, David) (Filed on 2/14/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER DENYING #217 THE JEFFERIES DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF ADJUSTING PAGE LIMITATIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/22/2019.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 220 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Replacement Docket 211 Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint - Redacted Version) against Ambac Assurance Corporation, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc., Chetan Marfatia, Danny Ray. Filed byPicerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, AMC West Housing LP, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Bragg Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, AETC Housing LP, Sill Housing, LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Riley Communities LLC. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 1/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 219 EXHIBITS re #210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Second Amended Complaint (Replacement Docket 210-2 Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint - Redacted Version) filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Related document(s) #210 ) (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 1/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 218 Declaration of John J. O'Donnell in Support of #217 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed byJefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #217 ) (O'Donnell, John) (Filed on 1/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 217 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (O'Donnell, John) (Filed on 1/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 216 DECLARATION of Rachel E. Epstein in Response To #210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Second Amended Complaint filed byAmbac Assurance Corporation. (Epstein, Rachel) (Filed on 12/28/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 215 Declaration of John J. O'Donnell in Support of #210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Second Amended Complaint filed byJefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Related document(s) #210 ) (O'Donnell, John) (Filed on 12/28/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER GRANTING #212 STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO FILE A DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/26/2018.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 24, 2018 Filing 213 STIPULATION re #211 Amended Complaint,,, extension of time to answer or respond, filed by Danny Ray. (Dunn, Robert) (Filed on 12/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 212 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File the Second Amended Complaint Under Seal filed by Ambac Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Madison, Steven) (Filed on 12/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 211 *Filing Error. See Corrected Version Dkt #220 * AMENDED COMPLAINT - Second Amended Complaint against Ambac Assurance Corporation, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc., Chetan Marfatia, Danny Ray. Filed byPicerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, AMC West Housing LP, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Bragg Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, AETC Housing LP, Sill Housing, LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Riley Communities LLC. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 12/17/2018) Modified on 1/17/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Second Amended Complaint filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Welch, *See Dkt #219 for Corrected Version*#2 Proposed Redacted Version of Second Amended Complaint, #3 Unredacted Version of Second Amended Complaint, #4 Proposed Order)(Welch, Donna) (Filed on 12/17/2018) Modified on 1/17/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER GRANTING #207 PLAINTIFFS' THIRD MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended Pleading due by 12/17/2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/7/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 208 AFFIDAVIT of John J. O'Donnell by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(O'Donnell, John) (Filed on 11/7/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 207 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Second Amended Complaint filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Welch, #2 Proposed Order)(Welch, Donna) (Filed on 11/7/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 206 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 31, 2018, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #204 Transcript Order,,, #205 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 11/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/3/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2019. (Related documents(s) #204 , #205 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 11/2/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 205 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 31, 2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 11/2/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 11/2/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 204 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/31/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 11/1/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 11/1/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 203 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/31/2018 1:28:39 PM ]. File Size [ 24360 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:50:45 ]. (courtspeak). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 202 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing re Discovery Letter Briefs #178 , #191 - held on 10/31/2018: See minute order for Court's rulings. Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Jeffrey Willian, Pratik Ghosh, Donna Welch. Attorneys for Defendant Ambac Assurance: Scott Mills, Rachel Epstein. Attorneys for Defendants Jefferies LLC, et al: John ODonnell, Justin Raphael.Attorneys for Defendants Danny Ray and Annandale: Robert Dunn, Reed Brodksy, Amer Ahmed. (FTR Time: 1:28pm to 2:19pm) Attachment: Minute order. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/31/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER GRANTING #200 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re attorney Pratik K. Ghosh). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/30/2018.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 200 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Pratik Ghosh ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12801634.) filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ghosh, Pratik) (Filed on 10/29/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 199 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING HEARING RE: Joint Statement for Resolution re Jurisdictional Discovery #178 . The Court grants the pending requests for counsel to appear telephonically at the hearing set for 10/31 at 01:00 PM. Due to the number of counsel appearing telephonically, the Court will provide a conference call number. Counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at Lili_Harrell@cand.uscourts.gov to obtain the dial-in information. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 198 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on Joint Statement for Resolution re Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Ambac Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Madison, Steven) (Filed on 10/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 197 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on the Joint Statement for Resolution re Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balber, Scott) (Filed on 10/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 196 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Appear by Telephone Stipulated Administrative Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Discovery Hearing filed by Annandale Plantation, LLC(A South Carolina LLC), Annandale Plantation, LLC(A Colorado LLC), Danny Ray. Responses due by 10/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rose, Joseph) (Filed on 10/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 195 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE: Joint Discovery Letter Brief #191 . Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on the Joint Statement for Resolution re Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Plaintiffs #192 . Counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at Lili_Harrell@cand.uscourts.gov to provide a direct dial number for this appearance and be available beginning at 01:00 PM until called by the Court. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER GRANTING MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on the Joint Statement for Resolution re Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Chetan Marfatia #188 . Counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at Lili_Harrell@cand.uscourts.gov to provide a direct dial number for this appearance and be available beginning at 01:00 PM until called by the Court. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 192 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on the Joint Statement for Resolution re Jurisdictional Discovery filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Welch, Donna) (Filed on 10/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 191 Letter Brief Joint Statement for Resolution re Jurisdictional Discovery filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 10/19/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER GRANTING #187 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re: attorney Benjamin T. Kurtz). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/17/2018.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER GRANTING #186 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re attorney Yates M. French). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/17/2018.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 188 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on the Joint Statement for Resolution re Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Chetan Marfatia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goldberg, David) (Filed on 10/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 187 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin Kurtz ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12766611.) filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kurtz, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 186 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Yates French ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12766492.) filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(French, Yates) (Filed on 10/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING #179 PLAINTIFFS' SECOND MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-3. Amended Pleading due by 11/16/2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/15/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 184 Statement of Non-Opposition re #179 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Second Amended Complaint filed byJefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Related document(s) #179 ) (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 10/12/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 183 Statement of Non-Opposition re #179 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Second Amended Complaint filed byChetan Marfatia. (Related document(s) #179 ) (Goldberg, David) (Filed on 10/12/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 182 Statement of Non-Opposition re #179 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Second Amended Complaint filed byAmbac Assurance Corporation. (Related document(s) #179 ) (Madison, Steven) (Filed on 10/12/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER DENYING #164 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/9/2018.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 180 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE: Joint Statement for Resolution re Jurisdictional Discovery #178 . Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 8, 2018 Filing 179 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Second Amended Complaint filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration D. Welch, #2 Exhibit 01, #3 Proposed Order)(Welch, Donna) (Filed on 10/8/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 178 Letter Brief Joint Statement for Resolution re Jurisdictional Discovery filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 10/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 177 REPLY (re #164 MOTION Relief From Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re #158 Motion Hearing,,,, Order on Discovery Letter Brief,,, ) filed byJefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 9/25/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 176 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #164 MOTION Relief From Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re #158 Motion Hearing,,,, Order on Discovery Letter Brief,,, ) filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 9/18/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 AMENDED ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE #164 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE (correcting #169 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/17/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Order denying #172 Discovery Letter Brief as moot, entered by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Order denying #165 Discovery Letter Brief, for insufficient meet and confer under Civil Local Rule 1-5(n), entered by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. The denial is without prejudice to a new filing after (1) proper meet and confer; and (2) ruling by trial judge on pending objection to discovery order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 172 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 9/14/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 171 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/29/2018 1:47:15 PM ]. File Size [ 17040 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:35:30 ]. (courtspeak). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER GRANTING #163 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-3. Amended Pleading due by 10/17/2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/11/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 *** PLEASE SEE #175 FOR AMENDED ORDER *** ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE #164 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Responses due by 9/18/2018. Replies due by 9/25/2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/11/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018) Modified on 9/17/2018 (blflc1S, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 168 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE: Joint Discovery Letter Brief #165 . Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 167 Statement of Non-Opposition re #163 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend First Amended Complaint filed byAnnandale Plantation, LLC(A South Carolina LLC), Annandale Plantation, LLC(A Colorado LLC), Danny Ray. (Related document(s) #163 ) (Dunn, Robert) (Filed on 9/10/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 166 Statement of Non-Opposition re #163 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend First Amended Complaint filed byAmbac Assurance Corporation. (Related document(s) #163 ) (Madison, Steven) (Filed on 9/10/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 165 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 9/10/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 164 MOTION Relief From Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re #158 Motion Hearing,,,, Order on Discovery Letter Brief,,, filed by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. Responses due by 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balber, Scott) (Filed on 9/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 163 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend First Amended Complaint filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Welch, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Welch, Donna) (Filed on 9/4/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 162 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 29, 2018, before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #160 Transcript Order, #161 Transcript Order, #159 Transcript Order,,, ) Redaction Request due 9/21/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2018. (Related documents(s) #160 , #161 , #159 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 8/31/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 161 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/29/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Ambac Assurance Corporation, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Mills, Thomas) (Filed on 8/31/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) (Modified on 8/31/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 160 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 29, 2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 8/30/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 8/30/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 159 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/29/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 8/30/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 8/30/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 158 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing re Discovery Letter Brief #148 held on 8/29/2018: Defendants' motion for a protective order staying discovery denied for lack of good cause shown. Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Jeffrey Willian, Donna Welch. Attorneys for Defendant Ambac Assurance: Steven Madison, Thomas Mills, Rachel Epstein. Attorneys for Defendant Chetan Marfatia: David Goldberg, Zachary Denver. Attorneys for Defendants Jefferies LLC, et al: John ODonnell, Scott Balber. Attorneys for Annandale & Danny Ray: Anne Marie Chapman, Justin Raphael, Robert Dunn. (FTR Time: 1:47pm 2:22pm.) Attachment: Minute order. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/29/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 157 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING HEARING RE: Discovery Letter Brief #148 to 01:30 PM on 8/29/2018 before Magistrate Judge Cousins. Counsel were previously granted permission to participate by telephone. The Court will provide call-in information to counsel via email. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 156 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on the Discovery Letter Brief filed by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balber, Scott) (Filed on 8/24/2018). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ambac Assurance Corporation #154 . Counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at Lili_Harrell@cand.uscourts.gov to provide a direct dial number for this appearance. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 154 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Stipulated Administrative Motion For Leave to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ambac Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Madison, Steven) (Filed on 8/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Appear by Telephone filed by Danny Ray and Annandale Plantation Defendants #151 . Counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at Lili_Harrell@cand.uscourts.gov to provide a direct dial number for this appearance. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Appear by Telephone filed by Defendant Chetan Marfatia #150 . Counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at Lili_Harrell@cand.uscourts.gov to provide a direct dial number for this appearance. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 151 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Stipulated Administrative Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Discovery Hearing filed by Annandale Plantation, LLC(A South Carolina LLC), Annandale Plantation, LLC(A Colorado LLC), Danny Ray. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henrick, Stephen) (Filed on 8/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 150 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on the Discovery Letter Brief filed by Chetan Marfatia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goldberg, David) (Filed on 8/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 149 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE: Discovery Letter Brief #148 . Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 148 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 8/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER RE #62 , #63 , #64 , #66 , #71 MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended Pleading due by 9/17/2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/17/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 146 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 7/16/2018 by Tamara Lange. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 145 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference that was scheduled on July 10, 2018, has been RESCHEDULED to July 16, 2018, at 3:00 PM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 144 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/12/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Chetan Marfatia, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Goldberg, David) (Filed on 4/27/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 13, 2018 Filing 143 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/12/2018, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #138 Transcript Order,, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2018. (Related documents(s) #138 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 4/13/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 13, 2018 Filing 142 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/12/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 4/13/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 13, 2018 Filing 141 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/12/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 4/13/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 13, 2018 Filing 140 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/12/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 4/13/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 13, 2018 Filing 139 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/12/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Ambac Assurance Corporation, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Mills, Thomas) (Filed on 4/13/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 13, 2018 Filing 138 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/12/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 4/13/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 137 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/12/2018.Total Time in Court: 9 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Jeffrey Willian, Donna Welch. Defendant Attorney: Scott Balber, John O'Donnell, Steven Madison, David Goldberg, Anne Champion, Scott Mills, Stephen Henrick, Robert Dunn, Amer Ahmed, Blanca Young, Yonaton Rosenzweig. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/12/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 136 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 4/12/2018. Total Time in Court: 1:51. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Jeffrey Willian, Donna Welch. Defendant Attorney: Scott Balber, John O'Donnell, Steven Madison, David Goldberg, Anne Champion, Scott Mills, Stephen Henrick, Robert Dunn, Amer Ahmed, Blanca Young, Yonaton Rosenzweig. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/12/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/12/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 134 STIPULATION Re Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by Ambac Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Madison, Steven) (Filed on 4/11/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER STRIKING #90 JEFFERIES DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT AMBAC'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/9/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING #130 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/5/2018.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 131 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Report filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 4/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 130 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12249840.) filed by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(O'Donnell, John) (Filed on 4/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING #128 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re attorney Rachel Epstein). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/22/2018.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 128 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Rachel E. Epstein ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12210938.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/22/2018 filed by Ambac Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Epstein, Rachel) (Filed on 3/22/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATED ORDER RE: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information for Standard Litigation. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/20/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 126 STIPULATION Order re Discovery of Electronically Stored Information for Standard Litigation filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Welch, Donna) (Filed on 3/19/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER GRANTING #124 STIPULATION REGARDING CASE DEADLINES AS MODIFIED BY COURT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/15/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
February 14, 2018 Filing 124 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #114 Order,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Regarding Case Deadlines)(Welch, Donna) (Filed on 2/14/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING #122 STIPULATION REGARDING TIME FOR FILING STIPULATION ON CASE DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/8/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
February 7, 2018 Filing 122 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #114 Order,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of B. Kurtz, #2 Proposed Order)(Welch, Donna) (Filed on 2/7/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 26, 2018 Filing 121 REPLY (re #64 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Dan Ray's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint ) Defendant Dan Ray's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed byDanny Ray. (Champion, Anne) (Filed on 1/26/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 26, 2018 Filing 120 REPLY (re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Annandale Plantation, LLC Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint ) Reply in Support of Annandale Plantation, LLC Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed byAnnandale Plantation, LLC(A South Carolina LLC), Annandale Plantation, LLC(A Colorado LLC). (Champion, Anne) (Filed on 1/26/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 26, 2018 Filing 119 REPLY (re #71 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byAmbac Assurance Corporation. (Madison, Steven) (Filed on 1/26/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 26, 2018 Filing 118 REPLY (re #62 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byChetan Marfatia. (Goldberg, David) (Filed on 1/26/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 26, 2018 Filing 117 REPLY (re #63 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 ) filed byJefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 1/26/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 23, 2018 Filing 116 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 11, 2018, before Judge Beth L. Freeman. Transcriber Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2812, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #112 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2018. (Related documents(s) #112 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 1/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 19, 2018 Filing 115 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/11/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Ambac Assurance Corporation, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Mills, Thomas) (Filed on 1/19/2018) (TRANSCTIBER: DIANE SKILLMAN( Modified on 1/19/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 17, 2018 Filing 113 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/11/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 1/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 17, 2018 Filing 112 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 11, 2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 1/17/2018)(TRANSCRIBER: DIANE SKILLMAN) Modified on 1/17/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 111 Case Management Conference - Initial. Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2018 11:00 AM. Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 2/25/2021 09:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2021 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 7/30/2021, 8/2/2021 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 8/2/2021, 8/3/2021, 8/4/2021, 8/5/2021, 8/6/2021, 8/9/2021, 8/10/2021, 8/11/2021, 8/12/2021, 8/13/2021, 8/16/2021, 8/17/2021 8/18/2021, 8/19/2021, 8/20/2021, 8/23/2021, 8/24/2021, 8/25/2021, 8/26/2021, 8/27/2021, 8/30/2021, 8/31/2021, 9/1/2021, 9/2/2021, 9/3/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Beth Labson Freeman.Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/11/2018. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 11, 2018 Filing 111 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/11/2018.FTR Time: 11:17 - 12:00. Plaintiff Attorney: Donna Welch, Jeffrey William. Defendant Attorney: Scott Balber, Justin Raphael, Steven Madison, David Goldberg, T. Scott Mills, Stephen Henrick, Amer Ahmed, Anne Champion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 10, 2018 Filing 110 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 1/10/2018 by Tamara Lange. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for 7/10/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 7, 2018 Filing 109 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Report Pursuant to Federal Rule of Procedure 26(F) filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 1/7/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER DENYING #39 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/2/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING #104 STIPULATION RE PARTIES' FILING OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/22/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 22, 2017 Filing 106 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on January 10, 2018 at 11:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 105 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant Chetan Marfatia (Goldberg, David) (Filed on 12/21/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 104 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Parties' Filing of a Joint Case Management Statement filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Donna M. Welch)(Welch, Donna) (Filed on 12/21/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 103 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on behalf of all Jefferies Defendants (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 12/21/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 102 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on behalf of Ambac Assurance Corporation (Madison, Steven) (Filed on 12/21/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 101 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Attachment 1)(Madison, Steven) (Filed on 12/21/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 100 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options all Plaintiffs (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 12/21/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 99 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #63 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 ) filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Welch, Donna) (Filed on 12/15/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 98 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #62 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 12/15/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 97 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #64 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Dan Ray's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint ) filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 12/15/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 96 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #71 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 12/15/2017)[Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 95 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Annandale Plantation, LLC Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint ) filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 12/15/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 14, 2017 Filing 94 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael Phillip Esser (Esser, Michael) (Filed on 12/14/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 11, 2017 Filing 93 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (filed on behalf of Defendants Dan Ray, Annandale Plantation LLC and Annandale Plantation LLC) (Henrick, Stephen) (Filed on 12/11/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 11, 2017 Filing 92 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #39 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York ) filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Welch, #2 Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit 1B, #4 Exhibit 1C, #5 Exhibit 1D, #6 Exhibit 1E, #7 Exhibit 2)(Welch, Donna) (Filed on 12/11/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 7, 2017 Filing 91 NOTICE by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc. re #39 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York (LeMoine, Melinda) (Filed on 12/7/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 7, 2017 Filing 90 NOTICE by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc. re #71 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (LeMoine, Melinda) (Filed on 12/7/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 6, 2017 Filing 89 Declaration of Noah S. Helpern in Support of #88 Supplemental Brief filed byAmbac Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)(Related document(s) #88 ) (Helpern, Noah) (Filed on 12/6/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 6, 2017 Filing 88 Supplemental Brief re #39 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York filed byAmbac Assurance Corporation. (Related document(s) #39 ) (Madison, Steven) (Filed on 12/6/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 4, 2017 Filing 87 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/30/2017 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 12/4/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 1, 2017 Filing 86 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/30/2017, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #85 Transcript Order,, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2018. (Related documents(s) #85 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 12/1/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
December 1, 2017 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/30/17 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 12/1/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 30, 2017 Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/30/2017 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Ambac Assurance Corporation, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Mills, Thomas) (Filed on 11/30/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING REGARDING #39 MOTION TO TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/30/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 30, 2017 Filing 82 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2017 re #39 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York filed by Ambac Assurance Corporation. Total Time in Court: 41 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Jeffrey Willian, Donna Welch. Defendant Attorney: Robert Dunn, Noah Helpern, Steven Madison, Justin Raphael, Scott Balber, Anne Champion, David Goldberg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/30/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 29, 2017 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Paul Raphael (Raphael, Justin) (Filed on 11/29/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 28, 2017 Filing 80 Certificate of Interested Entities by Chetan Marfatia (Goldberg, David) (Filed on 11/28/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING #77 MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/17/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING #76 STIPULATION REGARDING TIME FOR FILING RESPONSES AND REPLIES ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/17/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 77 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on Motion to Transfer filed by Annandale Plantation, LLC(A South Carolina LLC), Annandale Plantation, LLC(A Colorado LLC), Danny Ray. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Champion, Anne) (Filed on 11/16/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 76 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #63 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404, #66 MOTION to Dismiss Annandale Plantation, LLC Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, #71 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #64 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Dan Ray's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, #62 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of B. Kurtz, #2 Proposed Order)(Welch, Donna) (Filed on 11/16/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING #65 MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/14/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 14, 2017 Filing 74 Statement Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 11/14/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 14, 2017 Filing 73 Statement Civil L.R. 3-15 Disclosure Statement by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 11/14/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 72 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Ambac Assurance Corporation's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byAmbac Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Madison, Steven) (Filed on 11/13/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Ambac Assurance Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 11/27/2017. Replies due by 12/4/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Madison, Steven) (Filed on 11/13/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 70 Statement Corporate Disclosure by Annandale Plantation, LLC(A South Carolina LLC). (Champion, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 69 Statement Corporate Disclosure by Annandale Plantation, LLC(A Colorado LLC). (Champion, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 68 Certificate of Interested Entities by Annandale Plantation, LLC(A South Carolina LLC), Annandale Plantation, LLC(A Colorado LLC), Danny Ray (Champion, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 67 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Annandale Plantation, LLC(A South Carolina LLC), Annandale Plantation, LLC(A Colorado LLC), Danny Ray.. (Champion, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss Annandale Plantation, LLC Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Annandale Plantation, LLC(A South Carolina LLC), Annandale Plantation, LLC(A Colorado LLC). Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 11/27/2017. Replies due by 12/4/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Champion, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 65 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on Motion to Transfer to SDNY filed by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Balber, Scott) (Filed on 11/13/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Dan Ray's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Danny Ray. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 11/27/2017. Replies due by 12/4/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dan Ray, #2 Proposed Order)(Champion, Anne) (Filed on 11/13/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 filed by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 11/27/2017. Replies due by 12/4/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Balber, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Proposed Order)(Balber, Scott) (Filed on 11/13/2017)[Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Chetan Marfatia. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 11/27/2017. Replies due by 12/4/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goldberg, David) (Filed on 11/13/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING #59 MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE WITH MODIFICATIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/31/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 27, 2017 Filing 60 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byPicerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, AMC West Housing LP, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Bragg Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, AETC Housing LP, Sill Housing, LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Riley Communities LLC. (Welch, Donna) (Filed on 10/27/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 59 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on Motion to Transfer to Southern District of New York filed by Chetan Marfatia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenzweig, Yonaton) (Filed on 10/26/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING #51 AMBAC ASSURANCE CORPORATION'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/25/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 57 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #51 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint ) filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Welch, #2 Exhibit 01, #3 Exhibit 02, #4 Exhibit 03, #5 Exhibit 04, #6 Exhibit 05, #7 Exhibit 06, #8 Exhibit 07, #9 Exhibit 08)(Welch, Donna) (Filed on 10/23/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 56 Joinder re #51 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Chetan Marfatia. (Rosenzweig, Yonaton) (Filed on 10/23/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING #53 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/20/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 54 OBJECTIONS to re #49 Reply to Opposition/Response, #50 Declaration in Support of Reply in Support of Ambac Assurance Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Willian, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/19/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 53 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for David Lloyd Goldberg ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11810729.) filed by Chetan Marfatia. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rosenzweig, Yonaton) (Filed on 10/19/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 52 Declaration of Noah S. Helpern in Support of #51 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed byAmbac Assurance Corporation. (Related document(s) #51 ) (Helpern, Noah) (Filed on 10/18/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 51 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Ambac Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Madison, Steven) (Filed on 10/18/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 50 Declaration of Noah Helpern in Support of #49 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byAmbac Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #49 ) (Helpern, Noah) (Filed on 10/12/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 49 REPLY (re #39 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York ) filed byAmbac Assurance Corporation. (Madison, Steven) (Filed on 10/12/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 48 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #39 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York ) filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Welch, Donna) (Filed on 10/5/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 4, 2017 Filing 47 Joinder re #42 Renotice motion hearing, #39 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York by Chetan Marfatia. (Rosenzweig, Yonaton) (Filed on 10/4/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 4, 2017 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Yonaton M Rosenzweig for Defendant Chetan Marfatia (Rosenzweig, Yonaton) (Filed on 10/4/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 45 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ambac Assurance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ambac Financial Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Dimensional Fund Advisors, L.P. for Ambac Assurance Corporation. (Mills, Thomas) (Filed on 10/3/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 44 Statement re Corporate Disclosure Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Ambac Assurance Corporation. (Helpern, Noah) (Filed on 10/3/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 29, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Edward Dunn (Dunn, Robert) (Filed on 9/29/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 27, 2017 Filing 42 Renotice motion hearing re #39 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York filed byAmbac Assurance Corporation. (Related document(s) #39 ) (Madison, Steven) (Filed on 9/27/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 27, 2017 Set Hearing as to #39 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY DISCOVERY MOTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Re: Nos. #22 , #36 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 21, 2017 Filing 40 Declaration of Gregory Mayer in Support of #39 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York filed byAmbac Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #39 ) (Madison, Steven) (Filed on 9/21/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 21, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York filed by Ambac Assurance Corporation. Responses due by 10/5/2017. Replies due by 10/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Madison, Steven) (Filed on 9/21/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING #33 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/20/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING #32 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/20/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 20, 2017 Filing 36 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of B. Kurtz Exhibits 1-17, #2 Declaration Declaration of A. Ahmed Exhibits 18-21, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Welch, Donna) (Filed on 9/20/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING #28 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/20/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING #31 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/20/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 20, 2017 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11733338.) filed by Annandale Plantation, LLC(A South Carolina LLC), Annandale Plantation, LLC(A Colorado LLC), Danny Ray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Brodsky, Reed) (Filed on 9/20/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 20, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11732119.) filed by Annandale Plantation, LLC(A South Carolina LLC), Annandale Plantation, LLC(A Colorado LLC), Danny Ray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ahmed, Amer) (Filed on 9/20/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11731126.) filed by Annandale Plantation, LLC(A South Carolina LLC), Annandale Plantation, LLC(A Colorado LLC), Danny Ray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Champion, Anne) (Filed on 9/19/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen William Henrick (Henrick, Stephen) (Filed on 9/19/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Richard Rose (Rose, Joseph) (Filed on 9/19/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation To Extend Time Pursuant To Local Civil Rule 6-1(a) filed by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (LeMoine, Melinda) (Filed on 9/19/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #26 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/15/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 15, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Scott S. Balber ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11720089.) filed by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Balber, Scott) (Filed on 9/15/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 14, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda Eades LeMoine (LeMoine, Melinda) (Filed on 9/14/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #21 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/14/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 14, 2017 Filing 23 Discovery Letter Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Letter Requesting Entry of a Preservation Order and Expedited Discovery filed by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Abrahams, Emily) (Filed on 9/14/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 22 Discovery Letter Brief filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of B. Kurtz, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Welch, Donna) (Filed on 9/13/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Emily Abrahams ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11711583.) filed by Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Jefferies LLC, Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Abrahams, Emily) (Filed on 9/13/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Re: Dkt. No. #17 . Signd by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/04/2018. Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 18 Declaration of Benjamin T. Kurtz in Support of #17 MOTION for Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Documents and for Expedited Discovery filed byAETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 30)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Esser, Michael) (Filed on 9/5/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION for Preservation Order to Prevent Further Spoliation of Documents and for Expedited Discovery filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 9/19/2017. Replies due by 9/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Esser, Michael) (Filed on 9/5/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/1/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/1/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 8/29/2017. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP.. (Esser, Michael) (Filed on 8/29/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 9 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/12/2017. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Donna M. Welch ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11668631.) filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Welch, Donna) (Filed on 8/28/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey L. Willian ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11668597.) filed by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Willian, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/28/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth L. Deeley (Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/28/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 5 Statement Plaintiffs' Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP. (Esser, Michael) (Filed on 8/28/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP per LR 3-15 (Esser, Michael) (Filed on 8/28/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE by AETC Housing LP, AMC West Housing LP, Bragg Communities LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Riley Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, Sill Housing, LLC, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP L.R. 3-13 Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Esser, Michael) (Filed on 8/28/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Esser, Michael) (Filed on 8/28/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11668309.). Filed byPicerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC, Monterey Bay Land, LLC, Lackland Family Housing, LLC, Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC, Vandenberg Housing LP, Stewart Hunter Housing LLC, AMC West Housing LP, Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC, Meade Communities LLC, Bragg Communities LLC, Rucker Communities, LLC, AETC Housing LP, Sill Housing, LLC, Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP, Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP, Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC, Riley Communities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Esser, Michael) (Filed on 8/28/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC et al v. Ambac Assurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Ray
Represented By: Joseph Richard Rose
Represented By: Reed Brodsky
Represented By: Robert Edward Dunn
Represented By: Anne Marie Champion
Represented By: Amer S Ahmed
Represented By: Stephen William Henrick
Represented By: Reed Michael Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chetan Marfatia
Represented By: David L. Goldberg
Represented By: Zachary Denver
Represented By: Yonaton M Rosenzweig
Represented By: David L Goldberg
Represented By: Sean Akchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBAC Assurance Corporation
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Epstein
Represented By: Steven Geoffrey Madison
Represented By: Noah Samuel Helpern
Represented By: Michael Barry Carlinsky
Represented By: Thomas Scott Mills, Jr
Represented By: Steven G. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies Mortgage Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Paul Raphael
Represented By: Melinda Eades LeMoine
Represented By: Scott S. Balber
Represented By: Emily Abrahams
Represented By: John O'Donnell
Represented By: Scott Sonny Balber
Represented By: Michael Paul Jones
Represented By: Justin Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies Group LLC
Represented By: John O'Donnell
Represented By: Justin Paul Raphael
Represented By: Melinda Eades LeMoine
Represented By: Molly Priedeman
Represented By: Emily Abrahams
Represented By: Scott S. Balber
Represented By: Scott Sonny Balber
Represented By: Michael Paul Jones
Represented By: Justin Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies & Company Inc.
Represented By: John O'Donnell
Represented By: Justin Paul Raphael
Represented By: Melinda Eades LeMoine
Represented By: Emily Abrahams
Represented By: Scott S. Balber
Represented By: Scott Sonny Balber
Represented By: Michael Paul Jones
Represented By: Justin Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies L.L.C.
Represented By: John O'Donnell
Represented By: Justin Paul Raphael
Represented By: Melinda Eades LeMoine
Represented By: Molly Priedeman
Represented By: Emily Abrahams
Represented By: Scott S. Balber
Represented By: Scott Sonny Balber
Represented By: Michael Paul Jones
Represented By: Justin Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sill Housing, LLC
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Yates McLaughlin French
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Benjamin T. Kurtz
Represented By: Pratik Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: George Robert Gage, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willian P C
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Lamina E Bowen
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vandenberg Housing LP
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Yates McLaughlin French
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Benjamin T. Kurtz
Represented By: Pratik Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: George Robert Gage, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willian P C
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Lamina E Bowen
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riley Communities LLC
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Yates McLaughlin French
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Benjamin T. Kurtz
Represented By: Pratik Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: George Robert Gage, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willian P C
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Lamina E Bowen
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AETC Housing LP
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Yates McLaughlin French
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Represented By: Pratik Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: Benjamin T. Kurtz
Represented By: George Robert Gage, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willian P C
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Lamina E Bowen
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lackland Family Housing, LLC
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Yates McLaughlin French
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Benjamin T. Kurtz
Represented By: Pratik Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: George Robert Gage, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willian P C
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Lamina E Bowen
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meade Communities LLC
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Yates McLaughlin French
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Benjamin T. Kurtz
Represented By: Pratik Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: George Robert Gage, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willian P C
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Lamina E Bowen
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Picerne-Fort Polk Funding, LLC
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Yates McLaughlin French
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Benjamin T. Kurtz
Represented By: Pratik Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: George Robert Gage, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willian P C
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Lamina E Bowen
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, II, LLC
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Yates McLaughlin French
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Benjamin T. Kurtz
Represented By: Pratik Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: George Robert Gage, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willian P C
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Lamina E Bowen
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Leavenworth Frontier Heritage Communities, I, LLC
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Yates McLaughlin French
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Benjamin T. Kurtz
Represented By: Pratik Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: George Robert Gage, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willian P C
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Lamina E Bowen
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Bliss/White Sands Missile Range Housing LP
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Yates McLaughlin French
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Benjamin T. Kurtz
Represented By: Pratik Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: George Robert Gage, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willian P C
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Lamina E Bowen
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monterey Bay Land, LLC
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Yates McLaughlin French
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Benjamin T. Kurtz
Represented By: Pratik Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: George Robert Gage, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willian P C
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Lamina E Bowen
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlisle/Picatinny Family Housing LP
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Yates McLaughlin French
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Benjamin T. Kurtz
Represented By: Pratik Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: George Robert Gage, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willian P C
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Lamina E Bowen
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMC West Housing LP
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Yates McLaughlin French
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Benjamin T. Kurtz
Represented By: Pratik Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: George Robert Gage, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willian P C
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Lamina E Bowen
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bragg Communities LLC
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Yates McLaughlin French
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Benjamin T. Kurtz
Represented By: Pratik Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: George Robert Gage, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willian P C
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Lamina E Bowen
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monterey Bay Military Housing, LLC
Represented By: Yates McLaughlin French
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Pratik Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: Benjamin T. Kurtz
Represented By: George Robert Gage, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willian P C
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Lamina E Bowen
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rucker Communities, LLC
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Yates McLaughlin French
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Benjamin T. Kurtz
Represented By: Pratik Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: George Robert Gage, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willian P C
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Lamina E Bowen
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stewart Hunter Housing LLC
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Yates McLaughlin French
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Benjamin T. Kurtz
Represented By: Pratik Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: George Robert Gage, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willian P C
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Lamina E Bowen
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Detrick/Walter Reed Army Medical Center LLC
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Yates McLaughlin French
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Benjamin T. Kurtz
Represented By: Pratik Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: George Robert Gage, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willian P C
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Lamina E Bowen
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?