Ryan et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran et al
Plaintiff: MATTHEW VAN AUKEN, PATRICIA D. CASAZZA, LORIE VAN AUKEN, JOSEPH F. MAHER, CAROLINE BREITWEISER, JACOB KLEINBERG, COLIN RYAN, KRISTEN RYAN, DANIEL R. MAHER, SAM ERIC KLEINBERG, LAURA RYAN, LAUREN NICOLE KLEINBERG, KATHERINE MAHER, PATRICIA RYAN, JOHN F. CASAZZA, MINDY KLEINBERG, SARAH VAN AUKEN, KRISTEN BREITWEISER, The Estate of John J. Ryan and The Estateof Daniel L. Maher
Defendant: National Iranian Gas Company, Iran Airlines, National Iranian Oil Company, CENTRAL BANK OF IRAN, Islamic Republic of Iran, National Iranian Tanker Company, Iran's Ministry of Petroleum, Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps, Iran's Ministry of Commerce, Ayatollah Ali Hoseini-Khamenei, Iran's Ministry of Information and Security, Iran's Ministry of Economic Affairs and Finance, Hezbollah, National Iranian Petrochemical Company, Iran's Ministry of Defense and Armed Forces Logistics and ESTATE OF ALI AKBAR HASHEMI RAFSANJANI, DECEASED
Case Number: 1:2020cv00266
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Islamic Republic of Iran and on behalf of Plaintiffs, the Estate of John J. Ryan and the Estate of Daniel L. Maher, in the action styled Ryan, et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., 1:20-cv-00266 (GBD)(SN), who are each the estate of a victim of the terrorist attacks on September 11, 200; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs, the Estate of John J. Ryan and the Estate of Daniel L. Maher, were granted a Default Judgment against the Islamic Republic of Iran (1 :03-md-01570, Doc. No. 3014), and were awarded compensatory damages of $2,000,000.00 for conscious pain and suffering (1:03-md-O 1570, Docs. No. 3226, dated March 8, 2016; l :03-md-O 1570, Doc. No. 3229, dated March 9, 2016); and it is ORDERED that Plaintiff, the Estate of John J. Ryan, is awarded economic damages in the amount of $21,160,744.00 to be added to the existing judgment for $2,000.000.00 for pain and suffering as supported by the expert reports and analyses submitted by Dr. Stan V. Smith as Exhibit A to the Pantazis Declaration; and it is ORDERED that the Estate of Daniel L. Maher is awarded economic damages in the amount of $7,662,835.00 to be added to the existing judgment for $2,000.000.00 for pain and suffering, as supported by the expert reports and analyses submitted by Dr. Stan V. Smith as Exhibit A to the Pantazis Declaration; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs, the Estate of John J. Ryan and the Estate of Daniel L. Maher, are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/6/2020) (jwh)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Islamic Republic of Iran and on behalf of Plaintiffs, the Estate of John J. Ryan and the Estate of Daniel L. Maher, in the action styled Ryan, et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., 1:20-cv-00266 (GBD)(SN), who are each the estate of a victim of the terrorist attacks on September 11, 200; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs, the Estate of John J. Ryan and the Estate of Daniel L. Maher, were granted a Default Judgment against the Islamic Republic of Iran (1:03-md-01570, Doc. No. 3014), and were awarded compensatory damages of $2,000,000.00 for conscious pain and suffering (1:03-md-01570, Docs. No. 3226, dated March 8, 2016; 1:03-md-01570, Doc. No. 3229, dated March 9, 2016); and it is ORDERED that Plaintiff, the Estate of John J. Ryan, is awarded economic damages in the amount of $21,160,744.00 to be added to the existing judgment for $2,000.000.00 for pain and suffering as supported by the expert reports and analyses submitted by Dr. Stan V. Smith as Exhibit A to the Pantazis Declaration; and it is ORDERED that the Estate of Daniel L. Maher is awarded economic damages in the amount of $7,662,835.00 to be added to the existing judgment for $2,000.000.00 for pain and suffering, as supported by the expert reports and analyses submitted by Dr. Stan V. Smith as Exhibit A to the Pantazis Declaration; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs, the Estate of John J. Ryan and the Estate of Daniel L. Maher, are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs, the Estate of John J. Ryan and the Estate of Daniel L. Maher, may submit an application for punitive damages or other damages (to the extent such awards have not previously been ordered) at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/21/2020) (jwh)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 16, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 16, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
January 16, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 16, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Timothy B. Fleming dated January 15, 2020 re: Economic loss damages for the Ryan and Maher Estates. Document filed by PATRICIA RYAN(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF JOHN J. RYAN, Deceased).(Fleming, Timothy)
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pantazis, Dennis)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CENTRAL BANK OF IRAN, Hezbollah, Ayatollah Ali Hoseini-Khamenei, Iran Airlines, Iran's Ministry of Commerce, Iran's Ministry of Defense and Armed Forces Logistics, Iran's Ministry of Economic Affairs and Finance, Iran's Ministry of Information and Security, Iran's Ministry of Petroleum, Islamic Republic of Iran, Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps, National Iranian Gas Company, National Iranian Oil Company, National Iranian Petrochemical Company, National Iranian Tanker Company, ESTATE OF ALI AKBAR HASHEMI RAFSANJANI, DECEASED. (pc)
January 13, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03md1570. (pc)
January 13, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 13, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
January 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Second page is missing;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN; AYATOLLAH ALI HOSEINI KHAMENEI; ESTATE OF ALI AKBAR HASHEMI RAFSANJANI, Deceased; IRANS MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY; ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORPS; IRANS MINISTRY OF ECONOMIC AFFAIRS AND FINANCE; IRANS MINISTRY OF COMMERCE; IRANS MINISTRY OF DEFENSE AND ARMED FORCES LOGISTICS; IRANS MINISTRY OF PETROLEUM; CENTRAL BANK OF IRAN, a/k/a BANK MARKAZI; CENTRAL BANK OF IRAN, a/k/a BANK MARKAZI; NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY; NATIONAL IRANIAN TANKER COMPANY; NATIONAL IRANIAN GAS COMPANY; NATIONAL IRANIAN PETROCHEMICAL COMPANY; IRAN AIRLINES a/k/a IRAN AIR; HEZBOLLAH, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by CAROLINE BREITWEISER, KRISTEN BREITWEISER(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF RONALD BREITWEISER, Deceased), KRISTEN BREITWEISER(the surviving Spouse of Ronald Breitweiser), JOHN F. CASAZZA, PATRICIA D. CASAZZA(the surviving Spouse of John Francis Casazza), PATRICIA D. CASAZZA(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF JOHN FRANCIS CASAZZA, Deceased), JACOB KLEINBERG, LAUREN NICOLE KLEINBERG, MINDY KLEINBERG(the surviving Spouse of Alan D. Kleinberg), MINDY KLEINBERG(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF ALAN D. KLEINBERG, Deceased), SAM ERIC KLEINBERG, DANIEL R. MAHER, JOSEPH F. MAHER, KATHERINE MAHER(the Surviving Spouse of Daniel L. Maher), KATHERINE MAHER(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF DANIEL L. MAHER, Deceased), COLIN RYAN, KRISTEN RYAN, LAURA RYAN, PATRICIA RYAN(Surviving Spouse of John J. Ryan), PATRICIA RYAN(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF JOHN J. RYAN, Deceased), LORIE VAN AUKEN(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF KENNETH VAN AUKEN, Deceased), LORIE VAN AUKEN(the surviving Spouse of Kenneth Van Auken), MATTHEW VAN AUKEN, SARAH VAN AUKEN. (Attachments: #1 Rider to Request for Issuance of Summons)(Pantazis, Dennis)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-01570. Document filed by CAROLINE BREITWEISER, KRISTEN BREITWEISER(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF RONALD BREITWEISER, Deceased), KRISTEN BREITWEISER(the surviving Spouse of Ronald Breitweiser), JOHN F. CASAZZA, PATRICIA D. CASAZZA(the surviving Spouse of John Francis Casazza), PATRICIA D. CASAZZA(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF JOHN FRANCIS CASAZZA, Deceased), JACOB KLEINBERG, LAUREN NICOLE KLEINBERG, MINDY KLEINBERG(the surviving Spouse of Alan D. Kleinberg), MINDY KLEINBERG(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF ALAN D. KLEINBERG, Deceased), SAM ERIC KLEINBERG, DANIEL R. MAHER, JOSEPH F. MAHER, KATHERINE MAHER(the Surviving Spouse of Daniel L. Maher), KATHERINE MAHER(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF DANIEL L. MAHER, Deceased), COLIN RYAN, KRISTEN RYAN, LAURA RYAN, PATRICIA RYAN(Surviving Spouse of John J. Ryan), PATRICIA RYAN(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF JOHN J. RYAN, Deceased), LORIE VAN AUKEN(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF KENNETH VAN AUKEN, Deceased), LORIE VAN AUKEN(the surviving Spouse of Kenneth Van Auken), MATTHEW VAN AUKEN, SARAH VAN AUKEN.(Pantazis, Dennis)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CAROLINE BREITWEISER, KRISTEN BREITWEISER(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF RONALD BREITWEISER, Deceased), KRISTEN BREITWEISER(the surviving Spouse of Ronald Breitweiser), JOHN F. CASAZZA, PATRICIA D. CASAZZA(the surviving Spouse of John Francis Casazza), PATRICIA D. CASAZZA(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF JOHN FRANCIS CASAZZA, Deceased), JACOB KLEINBERG, LAUREN NICOLE KLEINBERG, MINDY KLEINBERG(the surviving Spouse of Alan D. Kleinberg), MINDY KLEINBERG(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF ALAN D. KLEINBERG, Deceased), SAM ERIC KLEINBERG, DANIEL R. MAHER, JOSEPH F. MAHER, KATHERINE MAHER(the Surviving Spouse of Daniel L. Maher), KATHERINE MAHER(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF DANIEL L. MAHER, Deceased), COLIN RYAN, KRISTEN RYAN, LAURA RYAN, PATRICIA RYAN(Surviving Spouse of John J. Ryan), PATRICIA RYAN(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF JOHN J. RYAN, Deceased), LORIE VAN AUKEN(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF KENNETH VAN AUKEN, Deceased), LORIE VAN AUKEN(the surviving Spouse of Kenneth Van Auken), MATTHEW VAN AUKEN, SARAH VAN AUKEN.(Pantazis, Dennis)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pantazis, Dennis)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENTRAL BANK OF IRAN, Hezbollah, Ayatollah Ali Hoseini-Khamenei, Iran Airlines, Iran's Ministry of Commerce, Iran's Ministry of Defense and Armed Forces Logistics, Iran's Ministry of Economic Affairs and Finance, Iran's Ministry of Information and Security, Iran's Ministry of Petroleum, Islamic Republic of Iran, Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps, National Iranian Gas Company, National Iranian Oil Company, National Iranian Petrochemical Company, National Iranian Tanker Company, ESTATE OF ALI AKBAR HASHEMI RAFSANJANI, DECEASED. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18476417)Document filed by LORIE VAN AUKEN(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF KENNETH VAN AUKEN, Deceased), KATHERINE MAHER(the Surviving Spouse of Daniel L. Maher), PATRICIA RYAN(Surviving Spouse of John J. Ryan), MINDY KLEINBERG(the surviving Spouse of Alan D. Kleinberg), PATRICIA RYAN(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF JOHN J. RYAN, Deceased), LAUREN NICOLE KLEINBERG, MINDY KLEINBERG(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF ALAN D. KLEINBERG, Deceased), PATRICIA D. CASAZZA(the surviving Spouse of John Francis Casazza), SAM ERIC KLEINBERG, MATTHEW VAN AUKEN, KRISTEN BREITWEISER(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF RONALD BREITWEISER, Deceased), KRISTEN BREITWEISER(the surviving Spouse of Ronald Breitweiser), LORIE VAN AUKEN(the surviving Spouse of Kenneth Van Auken), PATRICIA D. CASAZZA(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF JOHN FRANCIS CASAZZA, Deceased), SARAH VAN AUKEN, KATHERINE MAHER(as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF DANIEL L. MAHER, Deceased), KRISTEN RYAN, JOSEPH F. MAHER, CAROLINE BREITWEISER, JOHN F. CASAZZA, DANIEL R. MAHER, LAURA RYAN, JACOB KLEINBERG, COLIN RYAN.(Pantazis, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW VAN AUKEN
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA D. CASAZZA
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORIE VAN AUKEN
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH F. MAHER
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLINE BREITWEISER
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB KLEINBERG
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLIN RYAN
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTEN RYAN
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL R. MAHER
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAM ERIC KLEINBERG
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA RYAN
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAUREN NICOLE KLEINBERG
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHERINE MAHER
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA RYAN
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN F. CASAZZA
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINDY KLEINBERG
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH VAN AUKEN
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTEN BREITWEISER
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of John J. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estateof Daniel L. Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Iranian Gas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iran Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Iranian Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL BANK OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Iranian Tanker Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iran's Ministry of Petroleum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iran's Ministry of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayatollah Ali Hoseini-Khamenei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iran's Ministry of Information and Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iran's Ministry of Economic Affairs and Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hezbollah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Iranian Petrochemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iran's Ministry of Defense and Armed Forces Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTATE OF ALI AKBAR HASHEMI RAFSANJANI, DECEASED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?