M.S. et al v. New York City Department Of Education
Plaintiff: R.S., M.S. and A.S.
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education ("DOE") and New York City Department Of Education
Case Number: 1:2020cv01300
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Gabriel W Gorenstein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: SO ORDERED. (New York City Department Of Education answer due 6/5/2020.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/7/2020) (jwh)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. Motions referred to Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/7/2020) (jwh)
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from William K. Oates dated April 2, 2020. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education. Return Date set for 4/2/2020 at 12:00 AM..(Oates, William)
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Kevin Oates, JR on behalf of New York City Department Of Education..(Oates, William)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SO ORDERED. (New York City Department Of Education answer due 4/6/2020.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/4/2020) (jwh)
March 3, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint from 3/6/20 to 4/6/20 addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jonathan Pines dated March 3, 2020. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education..(Pines, Jonathan)
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department Of Education..(dnh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint served. New York City Department Of Education served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, Service Window Clerk. Document filed by R.S.(on behalf of A.S.); M.S.(individually); R.S.(individually); M.S.(on behalf of A.S.)..(Walsh, Tracey)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by M.S.(individually), M.S.(on behalf of A.S.), R.S.(on behalf of A.S.), R.S.(individually)..(Walsh, Tracey)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/7/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/14/2020) (jwh)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Walsh, Tracey)
February 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Tracey Spencer Walsh to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
February 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Tracey Spencer Walsh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New York City Department Of Education. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pne)
February 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Tracey Spencer Walsh. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: A.S.. The party was added to the case in error. (pne)
February 14, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
February 14, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Walsh, Tracey) Modified on 2/14/2020 (pne).
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Department Of Education ("DOE"). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18797981)Document filed by R.S.(on behalf of A.S.), M.S., R.S., M.S.(on behalf of A.S.), A.S...(Walsh, Tracey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.S. et al v. New York City Department Of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.S.
Represented By: Tracey Spencer Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.S.
Represented By: Tracey Spencer Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S.
Represented By: Tracey Spencer Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education ("DOE")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education
Represented By: Jonathan L. Pines
Represented By: William Kevin Oates, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?