LAVVAN, Inc. v. Amyris, Inc.
Plaintiff: LAVVAN, Inc.
Defendant: Amyris, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv07386
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #27 Letter Motion to Seal: GRANTED. PLAINTIFF MAY FILE UNDER SEAL ITS OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECLARATION of Jason Cyrulnik in Opposition re: #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or in the alternative,. MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6).. Document filed by LAVVAN, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Cyrulnik, Jason)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or in the alternative,. MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6)., #27 LETTER MOTION to Seal Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Paul Fattaruso dated October 30, 2020. . Document filed by LAVVAN, Inc., Amyris, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #27 .(Cyrulnik, Jason)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or in the alternative,. MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6)., #27 LETTER MOTION to Seal Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Paul Fattaruso dated October 30, 2020. [REDACTED]. Document filed by LAVVAN, Inc...(Cyrulnik, Jason)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 LETTER MOTION to Seal Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Paul Fattaruso dated October 30, 2020. Document filed by LAVVAN, Inc...(Fattaruso, Paul)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Martin Stone on behalf of LAVVAN, Inc...(Stone, Daniel)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR THE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (DOCKET NO. 17) SHALL FOLLOW THE DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THE PARTIES' OCTOBER 13, 2020 LETTER. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken) (Text Only Order) (nd)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Jason Cyrulnik dated October 13, 2020 re: Proposed Briefing Schedule. Document filed by LAVVAN, Inc...(Cyrulnik, Jason)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion to Seal. GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE TIS MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Amyris, Inc. waiver sent on 10/5/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. Document filed by LAVVAN, Inc...(Cyrulnik, Jason)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah L Segal on behalf of Amyris, Inc...(Segal, Sarah)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Koninklijke DSM N.V. for Amyris, Inc.. Document filed by Amyris, Inc...(Rosenthal, Brian)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Brian A. Rosenthal to RE-FILE Document #12 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for MARK LYON to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21962294. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #11 MOTION for MICHAEL D. CELIO to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21962427. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of OLIVER FONG in Support re: #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or in the alternative,. MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Amyris, Inc., LAVVAN, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Information regarding Arbitration [SEALED], #2 Exhibit B - Complaint [SEALED], #3 Exhibit C - Information regarding Arbitration [SEALED])Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #16 .(Fong, Oliver)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or in the alternative,. MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Amyris, Inc., LAVVAN, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #16 .(Rosenthal, Brian)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER MOTION to Seal documents in support of Defendant Amyris, Inc.'s Motion to Compel or Dismiss addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Oliver Fong dated October 2, 2020. Document filed by Amyris, Inc...(Fong, Oliver)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DECLARATION of OLIVER FONG [REDACTED] in Support re: #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or in the alternative,. MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Amyris, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Information regarding Arbitration [SEALED], #2 Exhibit B - Complaint [SEALED], #3 Exhibit C - Information regarding Arbitration [SEALED]).(Fong, Oliver)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or in the alternative,. MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). [REDACTED]. Document filed by Amyris, Inc...(Rosenthal, Brian)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or in the alternative,., MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Document filed by Amyris, Inc...(Rosenthal, Brian)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Amyris, Inc...(Rosenthal, Brian) Modified on 10/5/2020 (ldi).
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for MICHAEL D. CELIO to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21962427. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Amyris, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael D. Celio, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Celio, Michael)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for MARK LYON to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21962294. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Amyris, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark Lyon, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Lyon, H. Mark)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Venus Allahyarzadeh on behalf of Amyris, Inc...(Allahyarzadeh, Venus)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Oliver Joe Fong on behalf of Amyris, Inc...(Fong, Oliver)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian A. Rosenthal on behalf of Amyris, Inc...(Rosenthal, Brian)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: AS THE COURT HAS BEEN ENLIGHTENED TO THE FACT THAT UNREDACTED SEALED COMPLAINTS CANNOT BE FILED ON ECF, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO SEND AN UNREDACTED VERSION OF THE COMPLAINT BY EMAIL WITHIN 10 DAYS TO THE COURT'S CHAMBERS EMAIL ADDRESS: OetkenNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken) (Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order CIVIL COVER SHEET WAS SCANNED AND REPLACED. PULLED THE ORIGINAL CIVIL COVER SHEET FROM THE FOLDER. ORIGINAL COVERSHEET HAS 2 NATURE OF SUITS, THE INDIVIDUAL BRINGING IN THE ACTION (IN PERSON) INITIALED THE COVER SHEET REMOVING ONE OF THE NATURE OF SUITS.(gp) Modified on 9/14/2020 (gp).
September 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO FILE, WITHIN 10 DAYS, AN UNREDACTED VERSION OF THE COMPLAINT THROUGH THE SEALED-FILING FUNCTIONALITY OF THE ECF SYSTEM (COURT VIEW ONLY). (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken) (Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(pne) (pc). (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/14/2020) (gp).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Amyris, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401266158)Document filed by LAVVAN, Inc...(pne) (pc).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER - TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL: COMPLAINT/PETITION ONLY (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 9/10/2020) (pne)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Jason Colin Cyrulnik for noncompliance with Section 14.2 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (pne)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amyris, Inc...(pne)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAVVAN, Inc. v. Amyris, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amyris, Inc.
Represented By: Venus Allahyarzadeh
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Brian A. Rosenthal
Represented By: Sarah L Segal
Represented By: Oliver Joe Fong
Represented By: H. Mark Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAVVAN, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Fattaruso, II
Represented By: Richard Cipolla
Represented By: Kyle William Roche
Represented By: Stephen Lagos
Represented By: Jason Colin Cyrulnik
Represented By: Daniel Martin Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?