Komatsu v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Towaki Komatsu
Defendant: Dustin Ridener, Santana, Jerry Ioveno, Jane Doe 3, Rachel Atcheson, Howard Redmond, Eric Phillips, Nicholas Mason, Harold Miller, Jane Doe 4, Pinny Ringel, Gale Brewer, Marco Carrion, The City of New York, James O'Neill, Jessica Ramos, John Doe 3, Lance, Raymond Gerola, Jane Doe 1, Baez, James Clynes, Keck, Keith Dietrich, John Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2, Nick Gulotta, Ralph Nieves, John Doe 4 and Bill De Blasio
Case Number: 1:2020cv08004
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 11/19/2020 Re: Judge Edgardo Ramos #12 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)The City of New York. (aan)
November 19, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS ISSUED as to The City of New York. (aan)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF SERVICE FOR 20-CV-7502: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to complete the USM-285 forms with the address for the City of New York, issue a summons, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service for Case No. 20-cv-07502 to the U.S. Marshals Service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/18/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-07046-ER et al. (ks) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
November 18, 2020 Mailed a copy of #11 Order to Show Cause, Set Hearings to Towaki Komatsu at 802 Fairmount Pl., Apt. 4B, Bronx, NY 10460. (kh)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES AND TO SHOW CAUSE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1651 WHY FILING RESTRICTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED: The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to consolidate the above-captioned cases. Plaintiff is granted 15 days, or until December 2, 2020, to show cause why the Court should not impose the above filing restrictions. A declaration form is attached to this order. The Court sets a case management conference for December 15, 2020 at 11:00am. The conference will be held remotely and by telephone. The parties are instructed to call (877) 411-9748 and enter access code 3029857# when prompted. Any Defendant may file a letter submission in anticipation of this conference by no later than December 11, 2020. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). ( Telephone Conference set for 12/15/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/17/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-07046-ER et al. (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 17, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:20-cv-07046-ER. (mro)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INFORMATION SERVICE PACKAGE MAILED to Towaki Komatsu 802 Fairmount Pl. Apt. 4B Bronx, NY 10460, at, on 1104/2020 Re: #5 Order of Service via MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (ta) Modified on 11/4/2020 (ta). Modified on 11/4/2020 (ta).
November 4, 2020 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 11/04/2020 Re: Judge Edgardo Ramos #5 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)City of New York; New York City Police Department (NYPD) Inspector Howard Redmond; Mayor Bill de Blasio; former NYPD Commissioner James O'Neill; Gale Brewer; NYPD Detective Raymond Gerola, Shield #6577; NYPD Detective Nicholas Mason #6995; NYPD Lieutenant Ralph Nieves # 902104; NYPD Officer Lance #245; NYPD Officer Santana #7291; NYPD Officer Keck #6313; NYPD Officer Baez #5984; NYPD Officer Jerry Ioveno #5560; NYPD Officer Keith Dietrich #5779; Rachel Atcheson; Pinny Ringel; Harold Miller; Nick Gulotta; Jessica Ramos; Eric Phillips; Dustin Ridener; and Marco Carrion. (ta)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marco Carrion, Bill De Blasio, Keith Dietrich, Raymond Gerola, Nick Gulotta, Jerry Ioveno, Keck, Lance, Nicholas Mason, Harold Miller, Ralph Nieves, James O'Neill, Eric Phillips, Jessica Ramos, Howard Redmond, Dustin Ridener, Pinny Ringel, Santana. (ta) (ta).
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gale Brewer. (ta)
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Baez. (ta)
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rachel Atcheson. (ta)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Defendants City of New York; New York City Police Department (NYPD) Inspector Howard Redmond; Mayor Bill de Blasio; former NYPD Commissioner James O'Neill; Gale Brewer; NYPD Detective Raymond Gerola, Shield #6577; NYPD Detective Nicholas Mason #6995; NYPD Lieutenant Ralph Nieves # 902104; NYPD Officer Lance #245; NYPD Officer Santana #7291; NYPD Officer Keck #6313; NYPD Officer Baez #5984; NYPD Officer Jerry Ioveno #5560; NYPD Officer Keith Dietrich #5779; Rachel Atcheson; Pinny Ringel; Harold Miller; Nick Gulotta; Jessica Ramos; Eric Phillips; Dustin Ridener; and Marco Carrion, issue summonses, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Clerk of Court is also directed to mail a copy of this order and the complaint to the New York City Law Department at: 100 Church Street, New York, NY 10007. An Amended Complaint form is attached to this order. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/2/2020) Copies Mailed by Chambers. (mro) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. Modified on 11/2/2020 (mro).
October 15, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
October 15, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
October 15, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-08251-ER. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
October 15, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-07046-ER. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
October 8, 2020 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Granting IFP Application to Towaki Komatsu at 802 Fairmount Pl., Apt. 4B, Bronx, NY 10460. (dsh)
October 7, 2020 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #3 Order Granting IFP Application, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (vn)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/7/2020) (vn)
September 25, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Rachel Atcheson, Baez, Gale Brewer, Marco Carrion, James Clynes, Bill De Blasio, Keith Dietrich, Jane Doe 1(NYPD Officer 9/26/17), Jane Doe 1(NYPD Officer 9/28/17), John Doe 1(NYPD Officer 9/27/17), John Doe 1, John Doe 1(Tablet 9/26/17), John Doe 1(NYPD Officer 9/28/17), Jane Doe 2(NYPD Officer 9/26/17), Jane Doe 2(NYPD Officer 9/28/17), John Doe 2(NYPD Officer 9/27/17), John Doe 2(NYPD Officer 9/26/17), John Doe 2(NYPD Officer 9/28/17), Jane Doe 3(9/26/17), Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 3(NYPD Officer 9/28/17), John Doe 3(NYPD Officer 9/28/17), John Doe 3(NYPD Officer 9/27/17), Jane Doe 4, John Doe 4, Raymond Gerola, Nick Gulotta, Jerry Ioveno, Keck, Lance, Nicholas Mason, Harold Miller, Ralph Nieves, James O'Neill, Eric Phillips, Jessica Ramos, Howard Redmond, Dustin Ridener, Pinny Ringel, Santana, The City of New York. Document filed by Towaki Komatsu.(sac)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Towaki Komatsu.(sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Komatsu v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Ridener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Ioveno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Atcheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinny Ringel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gale Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Carrion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Gerola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Clynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Dietrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Gulotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill De Blasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Towaki Komatsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?