Rosario et al v. 2022 Eastchester LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alexandra Rosario, Amadou Camara and Elizabeth Ortiz
Defendant: 2022 Eastchester LLC, Frank Cotto and Noboru Takashima
Case Number: 1:2020cv09182
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sidney H Stein
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This case has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. Counsel for all parties are required to register promptly as filing users in accordance with the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. An initial pretrial conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is scheduled via teleconference for January 13, 2021, at 11:30 a.m. At that teleconference, counsel for all parties must be prepared to discuss the progress of the case and the scheduling of discovery proceedings, any dispositive motions, the feasibility of settlement or alternative dispute resolution, the dates for future conferences, and the submission of a joint pretrial order, and as further set forth in this Order. The parties shall dial 888-273-3658 and use access code 7004275 to join the teleconference. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to notify defendant's counsel of this teleconference. Attorneys are directed to consult the Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions and Judge Steins Individual Rules with respect to procedures for matters assigned to him. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 1/13/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein). (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 12/22/2020) (rjm)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Noboru Takashima served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. Service was accepted by Pablo. Document filed by Alexandra Rosario..(Wisniewski, Robert)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Frank Cotto served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. Service was accepted by Pablo. Document filed by Alexandra Rosario..(Wisniewski, Robert)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. 2022 Eastchester LLC served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. Document filed by Alexandra Rosario..(Wisniewski, Robert)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. 2022 Eastchester LLC served on 11/27/2020, answer due 12/18/2020. Document filed by Alexandra Rosario..(Wisniewski, Robert)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against 2022 Eastchester LLC, Frank Cotto, Noboru Takashima. Document filed by Alexandra Rosario, Amadou Camara, Elizabeth Ortiz..(Wisniewski, Robert)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 2022 Eastchester LLC, Frank Cotto, Noboru Takashima..(dnh)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Wisniewski to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; all of the party names as to whom the pleading is being filed against must be listed in the docket entry text. Select multiple parties by holding the 'Ctrl' button. All of the filers were not selected for the pleading; all of the filers must be listed in the docket entry text. Select multiple parties by holding the 'Ctrl' button. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Sidney H. Stein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Wisniewski. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code omitted. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation. (dnh)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wisniewski, Robert)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 2022 EASTCHESTER LLC, FRANK COTTO, and NOBORU TAKASHIMA, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Alexandra Rosario..(Wisniewski, Robert)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22421461)Document filed by Alexandra Rosario..(Wisniewski, Robert) Modified on 11/4/2020 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosario et al v. 2022 Eastchester LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Rosario
Represented By: Robert Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amadou Camara
Represented By: Robert Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ortiz
Represented By: Robert Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2022 Eastchester LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Cotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noboru Takashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?