Aron et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Plaintiff: Theresa Roberts, Janet Dawson, Stephen Morris, Eileen Esquilin, Peter Frank, Andrew Broderick, Song Jeng, Lisa Madden, John Doe 86, Cynthia Taylor, Sean Coughlin-Roberti, Dana Aron Weiner, Luz America Piedrahita Ayala, Alvin Dawson, Riley Coughlin-Roberti, Ryann Coughlin-Roberti, Lucy Aita, Barbara Ann Sullivan, Ronald Sierra, Michael Fields, Angus Jacques, Elena Bocchi, Christine Brozon, James Broderick, Michelle Frank, Francis Coughlin, Jr. and Maura Coughlin-Roberti, Karen Carlucci, Michael Bocchi, Vancena Dawson Donovan, Doris Hetherington, Gabriel De La Pena, Francis Coughlin, Jr., Tatiana Dawson, Ber Barry Aron, Daniella De La Pena, Peter Finnerty, Diane Bocchi Esola, Lucy Bocchi Kraus, Sylvia Aleman, Robert Flickinger, Felicia Fields, Daphne Bowers, Maura Coughlin-Roberti, Alana Flickinger, Constance Frank, Michele Bocchi-Sandello, Craig T. Flickinger, Vanita Aviles, Omar Gomez, Annette Simon, John Doe 87, Saul Espinal Ramos, Marybelle Vargas, Carl J. Flickinger, Matthew Bocchi, Louise Flickinger, Charles Dawson, Jairo Gomez, Victorine Dawson, Dennis Coughlin, Walter Gomez, Paul Bocchi, Kathleen Flickinger, Regina Martin, Carlos Martinez, Nicholas Gnazzo, Kevin Finnerty, Edmund Flickinger, Annette Fields, Janita Clyne, Lena Dawson, Robert Coughlin and Francis Coughlin, Germaine Alexander, Anthony Bocchi, Blanca Martinez, Kathleen Griffin, Dorothy Blanding, Carolina Broderick, Tammi Alexander, Ann Bocchi-Schwimmer, Edward Gnazzo, Matthew Broderick, Nicholas Bocchi, James Cherry, Marlyse Salome Bosley and Robert Coughlin
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Case Number: 1:2020cv09376
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint deemed filed on November 9,2020, Summons, Statement of Relatedness, Notice of Suit, Affidavit of Translator (along with translations of the above documents in farsi) mailed to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran, at the following address: Mohammad Javad Zarif, Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on 12/28/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 8163 9475 1530, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Jared Hess, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/L), U.S. Department of State, SA-17, 10th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20522, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (JKR)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Statement of Relatedness, Notice of suit, Affidavit of Translator mailed to Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran, ATTN: H.E. Mohammad Javal Zarif on 11/24/2020 by Registered Mail tracking # RE295893173US, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3)..(Ross, Javonn)
November 12, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
November 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
November 12, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
November 12, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jerry S. Goldman Esq. dated 11/10/2020 Document filed by Lucy Aita(individually, as surviving spouse of Paul Innella ), Lucy Aita( as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul Innella, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul Innella), Sylvia Aleman, Germaine Alexander, Tammi Alexander, Luz America Piedrahita Ayala, Barbara Ann Sullivan, Ber Barry Aron, Dana Aron Weiner, Vanita Aviles, Dorothy Blanding, Anthony Bocchi, Elena Bocchi(individually, as surviving parent of John Bocchi), Matthew Bocchi, Michael Bocchi, Nicholas Bocchi, Paul Bocchi, Elena Bocchi (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Camillo Bocchi, deceased, the late parent of John Bocchi), Diane Bocchi Esola, Lucy Bocchi Kraus, Michele Bocchi-Sandello(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Bocchi, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Bocchi), Michele Bocchi-Sandello(individually, as surviving spouse of John Bocchi), Ann Bocchi-Schwimmer, Daphne Bowers, Andrew Broderick, Carolina Broderick(individually, as surviving spouse of Mark Broderick), Carolina Broderick(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Mark Broderick, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mark Broderick), James Broderick, Matthew Broderick, Christine Brozon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Luigi Calvi, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Luigi Calvi), Christine Brozon(individually, as surviving spouse of Luigi Calvi), Karen Carlucci, James Cherry, Janita Clyne, Dennis Coughlin, Francis Coughlin, Jr(individually, as surviving sibling of Timothy Coughlin), Francis Coughlin, Jr(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alice Coughlin, deceased, the late parent of Timothy Coughlin), Robert Coughlin, Maura Coughlin-Roberti, Riley Coughlin-Roberti, Ryann Coughlin-Roberti, Sean Coughlin-Roberti, Alvin Dawson, Charles Dawson, Janet Dawson, Lena Dawson(individually, as surviving spouse of Calvin Dawson), Lena Dawson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Calvin Dawson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Calvin Dawson), Tatiana Dawson, Victorine Dawson, Vancena Dawson Donovan, Daniella De La Pena, Gabriel De La Pena(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Emerita De La Pena, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Emerita De La Pena), Gabriel De La Pena(individually, as surviving spouse of Emerita De La Pena), John Doe 86, John Doe 87, Saul Espinal Ramos, Eileen Esquilin, Annette Fields, Felicia Fields, Michael Fields, Kevin Finnerty, Peter Finnerty, Alana Flickinger, Carl J. Flickinger, Craig T. Flickinger, Edmund Flickinger, Kathleen Flickinger(individually, as surviving spouse of Carl M. Flickinger), Kathleen Flickinger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carl M. Flickinger, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carl M. Flickinger), Louise Flickinger(individually, as surviving parent of Carl M. Flickinger), Robert Flickinger, Louise Flickinger (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carl J. Flickinger, deceased, the late parent of Carl M. Flickinger), Francis Coughlin, Jr. and Maura Coughlin-Roberti, Constance Frank, Michelle Frank, Peter Frank, Edward Gnazzo, Nicholas Gnazzo, Jairo Gomez, Omar Gomez, Walter Gomez, Kathleen Griffin, Doris Hetherington, Angus Jacques, Song Jeng, Lisa Madden, Regina Martin(individually, as surviving sibling of James Cove), Regina Martin (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret Cove, deceased, the late parent of James Cove), Regina Martin (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis Cove, deceased, the late sibling of James Cove), Blanca Martinez, Carlos Martinez, Stephen Morris, Robert Coughlin and Francis Coughlin, Theresa Roberts(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Finnerty), Theresa Roberts(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Finnerty, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Finnerty), Marlyse Salome Bosley, Ronald Sierra(individually, as surviving spouse of Judith Berquis Diaz-Sierra), Ronald Sierra(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Judith Berquis Diaz-Sierra, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Judith Berquis Diaz-Sierra), Annette Simon, Cynthia Taylor, Marybelle Vargas..(Goldman, Jerry)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Elliot Strong on behalf of Lucy Aita(individually, as surviving spouse of Paul Innella ), Lucy Aita( as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul Innella, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul Innella), Sylvia Aleman, Germaine Alexander, Tammi Alexander, Luz America Piedrahita Ayala, Barbara Ann Sullivan, Ber Barry Aron, Dana Aron Weiner, Vanita Aviles, Dorothy Blanding, Anthony Bocchi, Elena Bocchi(individually, as surviving parent of John Bocchi), Matthew Bocchi, Michael Bocchi, Nicholas Bocchi, Paul Bocchi, Elena Bocchi (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Camillo Bocchi, deceased, the late parent of John Bocchi), Diane Bocchi Esola, Lucy Bocchi Kraus, Michele Bocchi-Sandello(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Bocchi, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Bocchi), Michele Bocchi-Sandello(individually, as surviving spouse of John Bocchi), Ann Bocchi-Schwimmer, Daphne Bowers, Andrew Broderick, Carolina Broderick(individually, as surviving spouse of Mark Broderick), Carolina Broderick(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Mark Broderick, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mark Broderick), James Broderick, Matthew Broderick, Christine Brozon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Luigi Calvi, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Luigi Calvi), Christine Brozon(individually, as surviving spouse of Luigi Calvi), Karen Carlucci, James Cherry, Janita Clyne, Dennis Coughlin, Francis Coughlin, Jr(individually, as surviving sibling of Timothy Coughlin), Francis Coughlin, Jr(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alice Coughlin, deceased, the late parent of Timothy Coughlin), Robert Coughlin, Maura Coughlin-Roberti, Riley Coughlin-Roberti, Ryann Coughlin-Roberti, Sean Coughlin-Roberti, Alvin Dawson, Charles Dawson, Janet Dawson, Lena Dawson(individually, as surviving spouse of Calvin Dawson), Lena Dawson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Calvin Dawson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Calvin Dawson), Tatiana Dawson, Victorine Dawson, Vancena Dawson Donovan, Daniella De La Pena, Gabriel De La Pena(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Emerita De La Pena, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Emerita De La Pena), Gabriel De La Pena(individually, as surviving spouse of Emerita De La Pena), John Doe 86, John Doe 87, Saul Espinal Ramos, Eileen Esquilin, Annette Fields, Felicia Fields, Michael Fields, Kevin Finnerty, Peter Finnerty, Alana Flickinger, Carl J. Flickinger, Craig T. Flickinger, Edmund Flickinger, Kathleen Flickinger(individually, as surviving spouse of Carl M. Flickinger), Kathleen Flickinger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carl M. Flickinger, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carl M. Flickinger), Louise Flickinger(individually, as surviving parent of Carl M. Flickinger), Robert Flickinger, Louise Flickinger (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carl J. Flickinger, deceased, the late parent of Carl M. Flickinger), Francis Coughlin, Jr. and Maura Coughlin-Roberti, Constance Frank, Michelle Frank, Peter Frank, Edward Gnazzo, Nicholas Gnazzo, Jairo Gomez, Omar Gomez, Walter Gomez, Kathleen Griffin, Doris Hetherington, Angus Jacques, Song Jeng, Lisa Madden, Regina Martin(individually, as surviving sibling of James Cove), Regina Martin (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret Cove, deceased, the late parent of James Cove), Regina Martin (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis Cove, deceased, the late sibling of James Cove), Blanca Martinez, Carlos Martinez, Stephen Morris, Robert Coughlin and Francis Coughlin, Theresa Roberts(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Finnerty), Theresa Roberts(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Finnerty, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Finnerty), Marlyse Salome Bosley, Ronald Sierra(individually, as surviving spouse of Judith Berquis Diaz-Sierra), Ronald Sierra(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Judith Berquis Diaz-Sierra, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Judith Berquis Diaz-Sierra), Annette Simon, Cynthia Taylor, Marybelle Vargas..(Strong, Bruce)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Islamic Republic of Iran..(pc)
November 10, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03md1570. (pc)
November 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MD-1570. Document filed by Lucy Aita(individually, as surviving spouse of Paul Innella ), Lucy Aita( as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul Innella, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul Innella), Sylvia Aleman, Germaine Alexander, Tammi Alexander, Luz America Piedrahita Ayala, Barbara Ann Sullivan, Ber Barry Aron, Dana Aron Weiner, Vanita Aviles, Dorothy Blanding, Anthony Bocchi, Elena Bocchi(individually, as surviving parent of John Bocchi), Matthew Bocchi, Michael Bocchi, Nicholas Bocchi, Paul Bocchi, Elena Bocchi (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Camillo Bocchi, deceased, the late parent of John Bocchi), Diane Bocchi Esola, Lucy Bocchi Kraus, Michele Bocchi-Sandello(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Bocchi, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Bocchi), Michele Bocchi-Sandello(individually, as surviving spouse of John Bocchi), Ann Bocchi-Schwimmer, Daphne Bowers, Andrew Broderick, Carolina Broderick(individually, as surviving spouse of Mark Broderick), Carolina Broderick(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Mark Broderick, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mark Broderick), James Broderick, Matthew Broderick, Christine Brozon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Luigi Calvi, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Luigi Calvi), Christine Brozon(individually, as surviving spouse of Luigi Calvi), Karen Carlucci, James Cherry, Janita Clyne, Dennis Coughlin, Francis Coughlin, Jr(individually, as surviving sibling of Timothy Coughlin), Francis Coughlin, Jr(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alice Coughlin, deceased, the late parent of Timothy Coughlin), Robert Coughlin, Maura Coughlin-Roberti, Riley Coughlin-Roberti, Ryann Coughlin-Roberti, Sean Coughlin-Roberti, Alvin Dawson, Charles Dawson, Janet Dawson, Lena Dawson(individually, as surviving spouse of Calvin Dawson), Lena Dawson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Calvin Dawson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Calvin Dawson), Tatiana Dawson, Victorine Dawson, Vancena Dawson Donovan, Daniella De La Pena, Gabriel De La Pena(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Emerita De La Pena, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Emerita De La Pena), Gabriel De La Pena(individually, as surviving spouse of Emerita De La Pena), John Doe 86, John Doe 87, Saul Espinal Ramos, Eileen Esquilin, Annette Fields, Felicia Fields, Michael Fields, Kevin Finnerty, Peter Finnerty, Alana Flickinger, Carl J. Flickinger, Craig T. Flickinger, Edmund Flickinger, Kathleen Flickinger(individually, as surviving spouse of Carl M. Flickinger), Kathleen Flickinger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carl M. Flickinger, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carl M. Flickinger), Louise Flickinger(individually, as surviving parent of Carl M. Flickinger), Robert Flickinger, Louise Flickinger (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carl J. Flickinger, deceased, the late parent of Carl M. Flickinger), Francis Coughlin, Jr. and Maura Coughlin-Roberti, Constance Frank, Michelle Frank, Peter Frank, Edward Gnazzo, Nicholas Gnazzo, Jairo Gomez, Omar Gomez, Walter Gomez, Kathleen Griffin, Doris Hetherington, Angus Jacques, Song Jeng, Lisa Madden, Regina Martin(individually, as surviving sibling of James Cove), Regina Martin (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret Cove, deceased, the late parent of James Cove), Regina Martin (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis Cove, deceased, the late sibling of James Cove), Blanca Martinez, Carlos Martinez, Stephen Morris, Robert Coughlin and Francis Coughlin, Theresa Roberts(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Finnerty), Theresa Roberts(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Finnerty, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Finnerty), Marlyse Salome Bosley, Ronald Sierra(individually, as surviving spouse of Judith Berquis Diaz-Sierra), Ronald Sierra(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Judith Berquis Diaz-Sierra, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Judith Berquis Diaz-Sierra), Annette Simon, Cynthia Taylor, Marybelle Vargas..(Goldman, Jerry)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Islamic Republic of Iran, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Lucy Aita(individually, as surviving spouse of Paul Innella ), Lucy Aita( as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul Innella, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul Innella), Sylvia Aleman, Germaine Alexander, Tammi Alexander, Luz America Piedrahita Ayala, Barbara Ann Sullivan, Ber Barry Aron, Dana Aron Weiner, Vanita Aviles, Dorothy Blanding, Anthony Bocchi, Elena Bocchi(individually, as surviving parent of John Bocchi), Matthew Bocchi, Michael Bocchi, Nicholas Bocchi, Paul Bocchi, Elena Bocchi (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Camillo Bocchi, deceased, the late parent of John Bocchi), Diane Bocchi Esola, Lucy Bocchi Kraus, Michele Bocchi-Sandello(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Bocchi, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Bocchi), Michele Bocchi-Sandello(individually, as surviving spouse of John Bocchi), Ann Bocchi-Schwimmer, Daphne Bowers, Andrew Broderick, Carolina Broderick(individually, as surviving spouse of Mark Broderick), Carolina Broderick(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Mark Broderick, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mark Broderick), James Broderick, Matthew Broderick, Christine Brozon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Luigi Calvi, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Luigi Calvi), Christine Brozon(individually, as surviving spouse of Luigi Calvi), Karen Carlucci, James Cherry, Janita Clyne, Dennis Coughlin, Francis Coughlin, Jr(individually, as surviving sibling of Timothy Coughlin), Francis Coughlin, Jr(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alice Coughlin, deceased, the late parent of Timothy Coughlin), Robert Coughlin, Maura Coughlin-Roberti, Riley Coughlin-Roberti, Ryann Coughlin-Roberti, Sean Coughlin-Roberti, Alvin Dawson, Charles Dawson, Janet Dawson, Lena Dawson(individually, as surviving spouse of Calvin Dawson), Lena Dawson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Calvin Dawson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Calvin Dawson), Tatiana Dawson, Victorine Dawson, Vancena Dawson Donovan, Daniella De La Pena, Gabriel De La Pena(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Emerita De La Pena, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Emerita De La Pena), Gabriel De La Pena(individually, as surviving spouse of Emerita De La Pena), John Doe 86, John Doe 87, Saul Espinal Ramos, Eileen Esquilin, Annette Fields, Felicia Fields, Michael Fields, Kevin Finnerty, Peter Finnerty, Alana Flickinger, Carl J. Flickinger, Craig T. Flickinger, Edmund Flickinger, Kathleen Flickinger(individually, as surviving spouse of Carl M. Flickinger), Kathleen Flickinger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carl M. Flickinger, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carl M. Flickinger), Louise Flickinger(individually, as surviving parent of Carl M. Flickinger), Robert Flickinger, Louise Flickinger (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carl J. Flickinger, deceased, the late parent of Carl M. Flickinger), Francis Coughlin, Jr. and Maura Coughlin-Roberti, Constance Frank, Michelle Frank, Peter Frank, Edward Gnazzo, Nicholas Gnazzo, Jairo Gomez, Omar Gomez, Walter Gomez, Kathleen Griffin, Doris Hetherington, Angus Jacques, Song Jeng, Lisa Madden, Regina Martin(individually, as surviving sibling of James Cove), Regina Martin (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret Cove, deceased, the late parent of James Cove), Regina Martin (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis Cove, deceased, the late sibling of James Cove), Blanca Martinez, Carlos Martinez, Stephen Morris, Robert Coughlin and Francis Coughlin, Theresa Roberts(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Finnerty), Theresa Roberts(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Finnerty, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Finnerty), Marlyse Salome Bosley, Ronald Sierra(individually, as surviving spouse of Judith Berquis Diaz-Sierra), Ronald Sierra(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Judith Berquis Diaz-Sierra, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Judith Berquis Diaz-Sierra), Annette Simon, Cynthia Taylor, Marybelle Vargas..(Goldman, Jerry)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goldman, Jerry)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Islamic Republic of Iran. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22502868)Document filed by Maura Coughlin-Roberti, Robert Coughlin, Marybelle Vargas, John Doe 87, Matthew Broderick, Theresa Roberts(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Finnerty), Matthew Bocchi, Robert Flickinger, James Cherry, Lucy Aita(individually, as surviving spouse of Paul Innella ), Andrew Broderick, Theresa Roberts(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Finnerty, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Finnerty), Michele Bocchi-Sandello(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Bocchi, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Bocchi), Vanita Aviles, Daniella De La Pena, Cynthia Taylor, Blanca Martinez, Alana Flickinger, Jairo Gomez, Gabriel De La Pena(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Emerita De La Pena, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Emerita De La Pena), Saul Espinal Ramos, James Broderick, Nicholas Gnazzo, Peter Frank, Nicholas Bocchi, Francis Coughlin, Jr(individually, as surviving sibling of Timothy Coughlin), Ryann Coughlin-Roberti, Paul Bocchi, Edward Gnazzo, Kathleen Flickinger(individually, as surviving spouse of Carl M. Flickinger), Charles Dawson, Constance Frank, Song Jeng, Edmund Flickinger, Stephen Morris, Tammi Alexander, Lena Dawson(individually, as surviving spouse of Calvin Dawson), Francis Coughlin, Jr. and Maura Coughlin-Roberti, John Doe 86, Walter Gomez, Ronald Sierra(individually, as surviving spouse of Judith Berquis Diaz-Sierra), Regina Martin (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret Cove, deceased, the late parent of James Cove), Ann Bocchi-Schwimmer, Lucy Bocchi Kraus, Lisa Madden, Victorine Dawson, Marlyse Salome Bosley, Gabriel De La Pena(individually, as surviving spouse of Emerita De La Pena), Louise Flickinger (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carl J. Flickinger, deceased, the late parent of Carl M. Flickinger), Annette Fields, Janita Clyne, Craig T. Flickinger, Carolina Broderick(individually, as surviving spouse of Mark Broderick), Karen Carlucci, Eileen Esquilin, Lena Dawson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Calvin Dawson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Calvin Dawson), Felicia Fields, Peter Finnerty, Michael Fields, Dana Aron Weiner, Daphne Bowers, Ber Barry Aron, Michelle Frank, Dennis Coughlin, Lucy Aita( as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul Innella, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul Innella), Kathleen Flickinger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carl M. Flickinger, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carl M. Flickinger), Christine Brozon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Luigi Calvi, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Luigi Calvi), Germaine Alexander, Regina Martin (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis Cove, deceased, the late sibling of James Cove), Sylvia Aleman, Carl J. Flickinger, Elena Bocchi (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Camillo Bocchi, deceased, the late parent of John Bocchi), Ronald Sierra(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Judith Berquis Diaz-Sierra, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Judith Berquis Diaz-Sierra), Kevin Finnerty, Janet Dawson, Christine Brozon(individually, as surviving spouse of Luigi Calvi), Doris Hetherington, Louise Flickinger(individually, as surviving parent of Carl M. Flickinger), Regina Martin(individually, as surviving sibling of James Cove), Carolina Broderick(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Mark Broderick, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mark Broderick), Alvin Dawson, Angus Jacques, Diane Bocchi Esola, Omar Gomez, Elena Bocchi(individually, as surviving parent of John Bocchi), Carlos Martinez, Barbara Ann Sullivan, Sean Coughlin-Roberti, Luz America Piedrahita Ayala, Michele Bocchi-Sandello(individually, as surviving spouse of John Bocchi), Tatiana Dawson, Annette Simon, Robert Coughlin and Francis Coughlin, Michael Bocchi, Kathleen Griffin, Dorothy Blanding, Riley Coughlin-Roberti, Francis Coughlin, Jr(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alice Coughlin, deceased, the late parent of Timothy Coughlin), Vancena Dawson Donovan, Anthony Bocchi..(Goldman, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aron et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Roberts
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Dawson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Morris
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Esquilin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Frank
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Broderick
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Song Jeng
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Madden
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 86
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Taylor
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Coughlin-Roberti
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Aron Weiner
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz America Piedrahita Ayala
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Dawson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riley Coughlin-Roberti
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryann Coughlin-Roberti
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Aita
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ann Sullivan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Sierra
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fields
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angus Jacques
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Bocchi
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Brozon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Broderick
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Frank
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Coughlin, Jr. and Maura Coughlin-Roberti
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Carlucci
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bocchi
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vancena Dawson Donovan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Hetherington
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel De La Pena
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Coughlin, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatiana Dawson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ber Barry Aron
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniella De La Pena
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Finnerty
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Bocchi Esola
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Bocchi Kraus
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Aleman
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Flickinger
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Fields
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daphne Bowers
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maura Coughlin-Roberti
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alana Flickinger
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Frank
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Bocchi-Sandello
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig T. Flickinger
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanita Aviles
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Gomez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Simon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 87
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul Espinal Ramos
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marybelle Vargas
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl J. Flickinger
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bocchi
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Flickinger
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Dawson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jairo Gomez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victorine Dawson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Coughlin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Gomez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Bocchi
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Flickinger
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Martin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Martinez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Gnazzo
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Finnerty
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund Flickinger
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Fields
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janita Clyne
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena Dawson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Coughlin and Francis Coughlin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Germaine Alexander
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bocchi
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Martinez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Griffin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Blanding
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina Broderick
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammi Alexander
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Bocchi-Schwimmer
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Gnazzo
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Broderick
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Bocchi
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cherry
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlyse Salome Bosley
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Coughlin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?