DoorDash, Inc. et al v. City Of New York
Plaintiff: DoorDash, Inc., Grubhub Inc. and Portier, LLC
Defendant: City Of New York
Case Number: 1:2021cv07564
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 . Defendant's November 3, 2021 request for a pre-motion conference, Dkt. No. 19, is granted. The Court will hold a teleconference regarding Defendant's proposed motion to dismiss on November 16, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
November 3, 2021 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Conference re Defendant's Anticipated Motion to Dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Darren Trotter dated November 3, 2021. Document filed by City Of New York..(Trotter, Darren)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. The parties' joint request to adjourn the initial pre-trial conference and deadline to submit a case management plan and status update (the "Request"), Dkt. No. 17, is granted. The Court construes the Request as a joint motion to stay discovery pending the resolution of Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss. [U]pon a showing of good cause a district court has considerable discretion to stay discovery pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(c). Integrated Sys. & Power, Inc. v. Honeywell Int'l, Inc., 2009 WL 2777076, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 1, 2009); see also Hong Leong Fin. Ltd. (Singapore) v. Pinnacle Performance Ltd., 297 F.R.D. 69, 72 (S.D.N.Y. 2013). Here, the Court finds good cause to stay discovery in this case, including because the resolution of Defendant's motion will inform the scope of future discovery. Accordingly, discovery in this case is stayed pending resolution of Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss. The initial pre-trial conference and deadlines to submit a proposed case management plan and joint status update are also adjourned pending resolution of that motion. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv)
October 22, 2021 Filing 17 CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Anne Champion dated October 21, 2021 re: joint request to adjourn conference and deadlines. Document filed by DoorDash, Inc., Grubhub Inc., Portier, LLC..(Champion, Anne)
October 14, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Bernard Collins on behalf of City Of New York..(Collins, Kevin)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Darren Trotter dated September 30, 2021., #1 Complaint. Defendant's September 30, 2021 request for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, Dkt. No. 14, is granted. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to November 4, 2021. SO ORDERED. City Of New York answer due 11/4/2021. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/30/2021) (rro)
September 30, 2021 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Darren Trotter dated September 30, 2021. Document filed by City Of New York..(Trotter, Darren)
September 29, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Darren Michael Trotter on behalf of City Of New York..(Trotter, Darren)
September 21, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Joshua Lipshutz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25083216. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Joshua Lipshutz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Joshua Lipshutz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25083216. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by DoorDash, Inc., Grubhub Inc., Portier, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua Lipshutz, #2 Exhibit A- Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Lipshutz, Joshua)
September 14, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. City Of New York served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, agent authorized to accept service. Document filed by DoorDash, Inc.; Portier, LLC; Grubhub Inc...(Champion, Anne)
September 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties participate in an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time listed below. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The parties are hereby ORDERED to submit via email (WoodsNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order in PDF format at least one week before the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order available at the Court's website (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-gregory-h-woods). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties submit a joint letter to the Court advising the Court on the status of the case at least one week before the initial pretrial conference. The letter should be filed on ECF in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules using the filing event "Letter." The status letter should not exceed six pages and should include the following as further set forth in this this Order. DATE AND TIME OF CONFERENCE: November 19, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/11/21) (yv)
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate SoftBank Group Corp., Other Affiliate SVF FAST (CAYMAN) LIMITED for DoorDash, Inc.. Document filed by DoorDash, Inc...(Champion, Anne)
September 10, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York. (vf)
September 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Anne Marie Champion to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
September 10, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
September 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Anne Marie Champion. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
September 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
September 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by DoorDash, Inc., Grubhub Inc., Portier, LLC..(Champion, Anne)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Uber Technologies, Inc. for Portier, LLC. Document filed by Portier, LLC..(Champion, Anne)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Just Eat Takeaway.com N.V. for Grubhub Inc.. Document filed by Grubhub Inc...(Champion, Anne)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by DoorDash, Inc...(Champion, Anne) Modified on 9/10/2021 (lb).
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Champion, Anne)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City Of New York. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25041361)Document filed by DoorDash, Inc., Portier, LLC, Grubhub Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Int. No. 2359-A, #2 Exhibit B - Int. No. 2390, #3 Exhibit C - Correspondence, #4 Exhibit D - Int. No. 1908-B, #5 Exhibit E - Int. No. 2054-A, #6 Exhibit F - E.O. 202.108, #7 Exhibit G - Int. No. 1897-A).(Champion, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DoorDash, Inc. et al v. City Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DoorDash, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Marie Champion
Represented By: Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grubhub Inc.
Represented By: Anne Marie Champion
Represented By: Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portier, LLC
Represented By: Anne Marie Champion
Represented By: Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Represented By: Darren Michael Trotter
Represented By: Kevin Bernard Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?