DeVary v. National Securities Corporation et al
Plaintiff: James DeVary
Defendant: National Securities Corporation and Forte Capital Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv07869
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 lr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/19/2021) (ks)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michael Nacht dated November 19, 2021. Document filed by Forte Capital Group, Inc...(Nacht, Michael)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Steven E. Mellen dated November 18, 2021. Document filed by National Securities Corporation..(Mellen, Steven)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven E. Mellen on behalf of National Securities Corporation..(Mellen, Steven)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Forte Capital Group, Inc. waiver sent on 9/21/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. Document filed by James DeVary..(Goldring, Orit)
October 19, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 12/13/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. National Securities Corporation waiver sent on 9/21/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. Document filed by James DeVary..(Goldring, Orit)
September 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Orit Goldring. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $300,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $300,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
September 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goldring, Orit)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Forte Capital Group, Inc., National Securities Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25089923)Document filed by James DeVary..(Goldring, Orit)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeVary v. National Securities Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James DeVary
Represented By: Orit Goldring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Securities Corporation
Represented By: Steven E. Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forte Capital Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Nacht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?