In Re: World Trade Center Lower Manhattan Disaster Site Litigation
Plaintiff: Miguel Zanabria, Marek Socha, Waldemar Ropel, Monica Arce, Richard Racioppi, Waldyslaw Kwasnik, Ludmila Khomik, Malgorzata Kuca, Gustavo Iturralde, Tadeusz Kowalewski, Administrator Barbara Niewojt, Jose Bello, Lucyna Foremska, Adam Marian Ginter, Public Administrator of King County, Roman Markut, various plaintiffs represented by Oshman & Mirisola, LLP, Dorota Markut, Rafael Valdez, Jasmin April Hernandez, Various plaintiffs represented by Cannata/Grochow, Elizabieta Kosousku, Tina L. Jones, Janus Kurkowski, Marco Fernandez, Tadeusz Foremska, Lois M Rosenblatt, Alex Anthony Sanchez, Alexandra Burnett, Genowefa Kaleta-Lech, Mayra Amaro Venegas, Dennis Vanfechtmann, Roseann Shubert Cimino, Richard Buckheit, Viasta Krysiuk, Manuel Checo, Nicholas Dirubbo, America Peralta, Ryszard Krysiuk, Robert Sienkiewicz, Voldymyr Khomik, Barbara Akus, Edward S. Mollahan, Lois Rosenblatt, Columbina Estrella, Bozena Kurkowski, Marcin Matuszewski, Daria Janina Wszolkowska, Noel Lorenzo, Maria Puello, Ninfra DeVito, Napoli Shkolnik PLLC, Luis Hernando Alvarez, Lois M. Rosenblatt, Gregory J Cannata & Associates, Leonardo Estrella, Gabriela Perez, Maria Moreno, Elaine Mesa and Edelmira Feliz
Defendant: NYSE Euronext, GPS Environmental Consultants, Inc., SURVIVAIR RESPIRATORS, INC., Cammeby's Management Company, LLC, Cunningham Duct Cleaning Co., Inc., Capital Properties NY LLC i/s/h/a/ Capital Properties, inc., National Association of Securities Dealers, Inc., 100 Wall Company LLC, Alan Kasman DBA Kasco, 114 Liberty Street Associates, St. John's University, Logan LLC, Kenyon & Kenyon, Citibank, NA, New York City Industrial Development Corporation, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Greenwich Court Condominium Association Corp., District Council 37, Columbia Casualty Company, Catamount Environmental, Inc., DB Private Clients Corporation, LeFrak Organization Inc., 230 Central Co., LLC, Vornado Office Management, LLC'S, State Street Bank and Trust Company, as owner Trustee of ZSF/Office NY Trust, One Liberty Plaza, Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Lehman Brothers Inc., Southbridge Towers, Inc., Battery Park City Authority, WFP Tower D Co. L.P., Central Parking System Systems of New York, Inc., Resnick Water St. Development Co., WFP One Liberty Plaza, CO, GP, CORP., MCI, Inc., Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., The Related Realty Group, Inc., Bankers Trust Company, Dynaserv Industries, Inc., Milstein Brothers Real Estate, LLC, WFP Tower D Holding I B.P. Corp., American International Realty Corporation, Applied Environmental, Inc., A.J Goldstein, 48 Wall LLC, Nomura Holding America, Inc., Structure Tone, (UK), Inc., American Stock Exchange Realty Associates, LLC, Empire State Properties, Inc., Bristol Environmental, Inc., RY Management Co., Inc., 120 Broadway, LLC., Cogswell Realty Group, L.L.C., New York City School Construction Authority, Pace University, MCI Communications Corporation, B.R. Fries & Associates, Inc., One Wall Street Holdings, LLC., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Maiden 80/90 L.L.C., 250 Broadway Associates, Belfor USA Group, Inc., Related BPC Associates, Inc., Lionshead Development LLC., Related Management Co., L.P., Brookfield Financial Properties, LP, 176 Broadway Owners Corp., City of New York, Verizon New York Inc., Senex Greenwich Realty Associates, LLC, 120 Broadway Properties LLC, New York University, 120 Greneich Development Associates, LLC, Contaminant Control, Inc., The Witkoff Group LLC, WFP Tower A Co., Two Broadway LLC, Ambient Group Inc., Borough of Manhattan Community College, 32-42 Broadway Owner LLC, 110 Church LLC., City University of New York, Seven Hanover Associates, LLC, Crown Broadway, LLC., G.L.O. Management, Inc., WFP Tower B Co., Trinity Centre LLC, Indoor Air Professionals, Inc., Structure Tone Inc., Black Diamonds LLC, Grubb & Ellis Management Services, Inc., Blue Millenium Realty LLC, Taconic Investment Partners, LLC, The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Trust Company NA, Board of Education of the City of New York, Ambient Group, Inc., HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, LLC, Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., Braun Management, Inc. and Daror Associates, LLC, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., Syska and Hennessy, Diversified Environmental Corporation, Tribeca North End L.L.C., AMEC Construction Management Inc., Rudin Management Co., Inc., American Stock Exchange LLC, Brown Harris Stevens Commercial Services, L.L.C., American Stock Exchange Realty Associaties LLC, 315 Hudson LLC, 60 Hudson Owner, LLC, The American Stock Exchange, L.L.C., Crown 61 Corp., Boston Properties, Inc., Lvi Environmental Services, Inc., Lehman Commercial Paper Inc., 59 Maiden Lane Associates LLC, 222 Broadway, LLC, Potomac Abatement, Inc., 2 Gold L.L.C., 80 Lafayette Associates LLC, Indoor Environmental Technology, Inc., 90 Church Street Limited Partnership, Bankers Trust Corporation, BFP Tower C MM LLC, Hilton Hotels Corporation, AIG American International Realty Corp., Syms Corp, 88 Greenwich LLC, BFP Tower C. Co., LLC, WFP Retail Co. G.P. Corp., American Stock Exchange Clearing LLC, Stoner and Company, Inc., Tishman Interiors Corporation, The City of New York Department of Education, Comprehensive Environmental Services Co., ACTA Realty Corp., Brookfield Properties Corporation, Board of Managers of the 120 Broadway Condominium, 63 Wall Inc., St. Johns University, Turner Construction Company, 176 Broadway Builders Corp., Brookfield Properties Holdings, Inc., The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Kibel Companies, J Hill Associates, Verizon Properties Inc., BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC., JPMorgan Chase Bank, 120 Broadway Condominium (CONDO #871), Environmental Testing, Inc., RFG New York Associates, LLC, Wall Street, LLC, MSDW 140 Broadway Property, L.L.C., 53 Park Place LLC., 2 Broadway LLC, 100 Church LLC., WFP Retail Co. LP., HMC Capital Resources LLC, Milro Associates, Inc., The Board of Managers of Liberty Terrace Condominium, Colliers ABR, Inc., 30 Broad Street Associates LLC., Century 21, Inc., Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastophe, Inc., Royal and SunAlliance Insurance Group plc, Weston Solutions, Inc., American Express Company, 150 Broadway Corp., Barrington Development Corp., Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Deutsche Bank, Abatement Professionals, WFP Tower D Holding Co. II L.P., AMG Realty Partners, LP, Logany LLC., WFP Tower B Co., G.P. Corp., Zar Realty Management Corp., Brookfield Properties, LLC, Hillman Enviornmental Group, LLC., Royal Environmental, Inc., 127 John Street Realty LLC, The Bank of New York Trust Company, American Express Bank, Ltd., 120 Broadway Holdings, L.L.C., 150 Broadway N.Y. Assoc. L.P., Bailey N.Y. Associates, Envirotech Clean Air, Inc., Kasco Restoration Services Co., Capital Properties, Inc., BT Private Clients Corporation, Hygienetics Environmental Company, Inc., 95 Maiden Member L.L.C., 130 Cedar, DBAB Wall Street LLC, Par Environmental Corporation, Hudson Towers Housing Co., Inc., Crown Properties, Inc., The Related Companies, L.P., MCI Communications Services, Inc., Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, B.C.R.E. 90 West Street, LLC, The Board of Managers of the One liberty Plaza Condominium (CONDO#1178), WFP Tower D Co., 715 Realty Co., 100 Church Street LLC, New York City Economic Development Corporation, 45 Murray Street Corp., Nasdaq, World Financial Properties, L.P., Martuscello, Joseph, Bankers Trust New York Corporation, New York City Industrial Development Agency, Marcor Remediation, Inc., 130 Cedar Street, Morgan Stanley MGMT Capital, Inc., Milford Management Corp., Mayore Estates LLC & 80 Lafayette Association LLC as Tenants in Common, 22 Cortlandt Street sub floor 1, 2, 3 and floor 1, 2, 3, Mazal Group LLC, 25 Broadway Office Properties LLC, 73 Warren Street, LLP, CDL New York LLC, 63 Wall, Inc., eagle one roofing contactors inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Tucker Anthony, Inc., Clayton Environmental Consultants, WFP Tower A. Co. G.P. Corp., Crown 61 Associates L.P., Liberty View Associates, L.P., The Bank of New York, Inc., The One Liberty Plaza Condominium (CONDO#1178), NYSE Inc., 52 Habitat Co., 233 Broadway Owners, LLC, McClier Corporation, Covino Environmental Associates, Inc., Lefrak Organization, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., LVI Services, Inc., Tellabs Operations, Inc., G.P. Corp., Abscope Environmental, Inc., RB 52 Co. LLC, Moody's Holdings, Inc., Pinnacle Environmental Corporation, WFP One Liberty Plaza Co., L.P., GLO MANAGEMENT, INC.,, WFP Tower B Co. LP, Toscorp. Inc., Newmark & Company Real Estate, Inc. i/s/h/a Newmark Knight Frank, Board of Managers of The Hudson View East Condominium, General Reinsurance Corp. i/s/h/a General Re Services Corp., 160 Water St. Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Law Engineering P.C., The Board of Managers of Liberty House Condominium, MK West Street Company, L.P., Brown Brothers Harriman & CO., WFP Tower B Holding Co. LP, Structure Tone Global Services, Inc., Resnick 75 Park Place LLC, Rockrose Development Corp., TRC Engineers, Inc., Silverstein Properties, Inc., One Broadway, LLC, AT&T Wireless Services, Inc., ATTORNEY Hillman Enviornmental Group, LLC., One Wall Street Corporation, Tully Construction Co. Inc., 75 Broad LLC, ERP Operating Limited Partnership and Equity Residential Properties Management Corp. s/h/a Equity Residential and ERO Operating Unlimited Partnership, Mayore Estates LLC, WFP Tower A Co. LP, 63 Wall Street, Inc., New Water Street Corporation (defendant), 20 Broad Street, German American Capital Corporation, GB Development Group, FGP 90 West Street, Inc., Hudson View East Condominium, Department of Small Business Services, Settlement Administrator for Certain Settlements, Jemb Realty Corp., Harrahs Operating Company, General RE Services Corp., UBS Financial Services, Inc., William F. Collins, Jones Lang LaSalle Services, Inc., Norwich Associates, Inc., WFP Tower D Holding Co. L.L.P., RY Management Co., Inc. i/s/h/a RY Mnagement, 120 Liberty Street, LLC, 150 Broadway N.Y. Associates L.P., Related Companies, L.P., 160 Water Street Associates, The American Stock Exchange, Mayore Estates LLC and 80 Lafayette Associates LLC, Mayore Estates LLC, 22 Cortlandt Street sub floors 1, 2, 3 and floors 1, 2, 3, Deutsche Bank DBAB Wall Street, LLC, Criterion Laboratories, Inc., Darling Asbestos Disposal Company, Inc., The Rector, Church-Wardens, and Vestrymen of Trinity Church, in the city of New-York, Cushman & Wakefield 111 Wall, Inc., Environmental Products and Services, Inc., Trizechahn Regional Pooling, LLC, New Liberty Plaza LP., TRZ Holdings, LLC, Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc., Ann Taylor Stores Corporation, Enviroserve, Inc., Brookfield Partners, LP, Environmental Services and Technologies, Inc., 111 Wall Street LLC, New York City Department of Education, 10 Gold L.L.C. i/s/h/a 2 Gold L.L.C., 40 Rector Holdings, LLC, Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., 33 Rector Street Condominium, Greystone Properties, Plaza Construction Corp., New York University Real Estate Corporation, Hillman Environmental Group, LLC, Milstein Properties Corp., CAP, Inc., William F. Collins Architects, Continental Casualty Company, District Council 37 Benefits Fund Trust i/s/h/a 37 Benefits Fund Trust, Century 21 Department Stores LLC, Murray Hill Properties, NYSE, Specialty Service Contracting, Inc., 80 Lafayette Associates, LLC, 22 Cortlandt Street sub floors 1, 2, 3 and floors 1, 2, 3, 20 Broad Street, LLC i/s/h/a 20 Broad St. Co., One Wall Street Holdings LLC, Harris Beach Settlement Administrator for AIG-Related Settlements, Sakele Brothers L.L.C., 1 Whitehall LP, CDL New York LLC i/s/h/a CDL New York LLC Millennium Broadway, Broadway West Street Associates LP, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Jack Resnick & Sons, Inc., Ambassador Construction, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Interiors Corporation, NYSE, Inc. and Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastophe, Inc. doing business as BMS CAT
Consolidated Defendant: Edison Parking Management, L.P., MTA Capital Construction, Structure Tone Global Services Inc., Lionshead Development LLC, Structure Tone (UK) Inc., Central Parking System of New York, Inc., BT Private Clients Corp., Harrah's Operating Company, Inc., Boston Properties Inc., Lionshead 110 Development LLC, Allright Parking Management, Inc., Metropolitan Transportation Authority and Tully Industries
Appellant: Tier 4 Plaintiffs
Cross Defendant: Worby Groner Edelman & Napoli Bern, LLP, Lionshead 110 Development, LLC, Lionshead Development, LLC, Tribeca Pointe LLC, 30 Broad Street Associates, LLC, Department of Defense, American Building Maintenance Industries, Inc., 80 Lafeyette Associates, LLC, Mayore Estates, LLC, Battery Pointe Condominiums, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Brookfield Properties Holdings Inc., Defendants, World Trade Center Lower Manhattan Disaster Site Litigation, Sencam, Inc., Murray Hill Properties LLC, Trammell Crow Company, Trammell Crow Corporate Services, Inc. and Lighthouse Real Estate Ventures, Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Krystyna Mierzejewski, Vasta Krysiuk and Ireneusz Mierzejewski
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Tully Industries, Inc. and Tully Construction Co., Inc.
Material Witness: Dr Carlos Serrano
Intervenor: Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman
Interested Party: Worby Groner Edelman and WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Mount Sinai Health System, Inc.
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: American Internnational Realty Corp (AIRC)
Case Number: 1:2021mc00102
Filed: August 9, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331pi
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 8244 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Gil M. Coogler dated 3/4/2020 re: The purpose of this correspondence is to seek confirmation of whether the 911 Litigation Database maintained by the Southern District of New York is currently available for access, and if so, what process do we need to undergo to obtain access to the database. ENDORSEMENT: The database is not in the Court files. It was maintained by the law firms in the cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/4/2020) (jwh)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8243 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s) (collectively, "the Deutsche Bank Entities"); Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct,including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation, and demolition) operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are, voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/21/2019) (ama)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8242 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation, as successor to The Bank Of New York Company, Inc.; The Bank Of New York; One Wall Street Holdings LLC; 4101 Austin Blvd Corporation; and The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A., arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation, and demolition operations, at the premises located at the BNY Mellon Buildings(One Wall Street, 101 Barclay Street, and 234 Greenwich Street) in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/21/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:05-cv-03090-AKH, 1:06-cv-15192-AKH(ama)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8220 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against RBC Dain Rauscher Inc. f/k/a Tucker Anthony, Inc., only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at One World Financial Center (200 Liberty Street) in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/13/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02744-AKH(kv)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8219 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(l)(A)(ii): l. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring- Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/13/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01719-AKH(kv)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8218 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiffs against Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street (Two World Financial Center) in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. So Ordered., (HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, LLC terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/13/19) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01719-AKH(yv)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8217 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff against Brookfield Office Properties Inc., Brookfield Asset Management Inc., Brookfield Properties OLP Co. LLC (f/k/a BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC), Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., Brookfield Properties One WFC Co. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. L.P.), Brookfield Properties One WFC G.P. Corp.(f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp.), WFP Tower B Co. L.P., WFP Tower B. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp.), BFP Tower C Co. LLC, BFP Tower C MM LLC, WFP Tower D Co. LP., WFP Tower D. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower D Co. G.P. Corp.) and WFP Retail Co. L.P.; BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe; Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC, Hillmann Environmental, Inc., Hillmann Environmental Company, Inc., Clnistopher Hillmann and Joseph Hillmann, and Hillmann-related companies; remediation, construction, deconstruction, testing, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 165 Broadway ("One Liberty Plaza") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. So Ordered., (HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, LLC, WFP Retail Co. LP., WFP Retail Co. LP., WFP Retail Co. LP., WFP Retail Co. LP., WFP Retail Co. LP., WFP Retail Co. LP., WFP Retail Co. LP., WFP Tower A Co. LP, WFP Tower A Co. LP, WFP Tower A Co. LP, WFP Tower A Co. LP, WFP Tower A Co. LP, WFP Tower A Co. LP, WFP Tower A Co. LP, WFP Tower A. Co. G.P. Corp., WFP Tower A. Co. G.P. Corp., WFP Tower A. Co. G.P. Corp., WFP Tower A. Co. G.P. Corp., WFP Tower A. Co. G.P. Corp., WFP Tower A. Co. G.P. Corp., WFP Tower A. Co. G.P. Corp., WFP Tower B Co. LP, WFP Tower B Co. LP, WFP Tower B Co. LP, WFP Tower B Co. LP, WFP Tower B Co. LP, WFP Tower B Co. LP, WFP Tower B Co. LP, WFP Tower B Co., G.P. Corp., WFP Tower B Co., G.P. Corp., WFP Tower B Co., G.P. Corp., WFP Tower B Co., G.P. Corp., WFP Tower B Co., G.P. Corp., WFP Tower B Co., G.P. Corp., WFP Tower B Co., G.P. Corp., WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D Co. L.P., BFP Tower C Co. L.L.C. and Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc. terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/13/19) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:05-cv-09822-AKH(yv)
September 11, 2019 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #8216 Notice of Appeal, filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
September 11, 2019 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #8216 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8216 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #8215 Clerk's Judgment,, #8212 Memorandum & Opinion,,,, Terminate Motions,,,. Document filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17581431. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (LoPalo, Christopher)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8214 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Benjamin E. Haglund dated 8/28/19 re: request that the following former Day Pitney employees be removed from the email/service list for this case. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered., (Attorney Alashia L Chan; Joseph A Clark; Cynthia K. Courtney; Jairo Andres Mayor; Brian E. Moffitt; Maureen C. Pavely; Aaron J Stahl; Andres Acebo and Rasika Chakravarthy terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/3/19) (yv)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8215 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (66 in 1:09-cv-10591-AKH) Memorandum & Opinion. That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order Dismissing Cases dated August 3 0, 2019, BPCA' s motion to dismiss is granted; judgment is entered for defendants, with costs to be taxed by the Clerk, and the case at the docket numbers listed in the appendix are closed; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 08/30/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(ad)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8213 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (180 in 1:05-cv-03090-AKH, 180 in 1:05-cv-03090-AKH, 180 in 1:05-cv-03090-AKH, 180 in 1:05-cv-03090-AKH, 180 in 1:05-cv-03090-AKH, 180 in 1:05-cv-03090-AKH, 78 in 1:10-cv-04226-AKH, 78 in 1:10-cv-04226-AKH, 78 in 1:10-cv-04226-AKH, 78 in 1:10-cv-04226-AKH, 78 in 1:10-cv-04226-AKH, 78 in 1:10-cv-04226-AKH, 114 in 1:06-cv-05289-AKH, 114 in 1:06-cv-05289-AKH, 114 in 1:06-cv-05289-AKH, 114 in 1:06-cv-05289-AKH, 114 in 1:06-cv-05289-AKH, 114 in 1:06-cv-05289-AKH, 126 in 1:06-cv-05325-AKH, 126 in 1:06-cv-05325-AKH, 126 in 1:06-cv-05325-AKH, 126 in 1:06-cv-05325-AKH, 126 in 1:06-cv-05325-AKH, 126 in 1:06-cv-05325-AKH, 87 in 1:07-cv-01669-AKH, 87 in 1:07-cv-01669-AKH, 87 in 1:07-cv-01669-AKH, 87 in 1:07-cv-01669-AKH, 87 in 1:07-cv-01669-AKH, 87 in 1:07-cv-01669-AKH) Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (8212 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 8212 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) Memorandum & Opinion,,,, Terminate Motions,,,. in favor of Eugeniusz Jastrzebowski, Henryk Ciborowski, Irena Barbara Ciborowski, Kalina Balcer, Lucyna Foremska, Maria Moreno, Waldermar Balcer against Battery Park City Authority. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons Stated on the record at a hearing held on July 25, 2019, and stated in the Court's Order dismissing the cases dated August 29, 2019, the claims of the following plaintiffs against Battery Park City are dismissed and these cases are closed: Plaintiffs Docket number WALDEMAR BALCER and 08-cv-05325 KALINA BALCER. HENRTY K. CIBOROWSKI and 10-cv-04226 IRENA BARBARA CIBOROWSKI LUCYNA FOREMSKA and 05-cv-03090 TADEUSZ FOREMSKA EUGENIUSZ JASTRAZEBROWSKI 06-cv-5289 MARIA MORENO 07-cv-01669 (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 08/30/2019) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(dt) .
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8212 OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASES re: #8106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) the Amended Complaints. filed by Battery Park City Authority, WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc.., Motions terminated: #8106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) the Amended Complaints. filed by Battery Park City Authority, WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc. BPCA's motion to dismiss is granted. The clerk shall terminate the motion (No. 21-mc-102, ECF 8106), enter judgment for defendants, with costs to be taxed by the Clerk, and close the cases at the docket numbers listed in the appendix. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/30/19) (yv) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8211 ORDER granting (174) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:05-cv-03090-AKH; granting (8110) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH; granting (108) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:06-cv-05289-AKH; granting (120) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:06-cv-05325-AKH; granting (81) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:07-cv-01669-AKH; granting (72) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:10-cv-04226-AKH. For the reasons stated on the record at hearing held on July 25, 2019, the claims of the following plaintiffs against Battery Park City are dismissed: as further set forth herein. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the motions at 21 MC 102, ECF 811O; 05-cv- 3090, ECF 174; 06-cv-5289, ECF 108; 06-cv-5325, ECF 120; 07-cv-1669, ECF 81; and 10-cv-4226, ECF 72, and to mark these cases closed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/29/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al. (kv) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
August 15, 2019 Filing 8210 NOTICE of (Joint) of Supplemental Evidence re: #8203 Order,,. Document filed by Battery Park City Authority, WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Warner, Margaret)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8209 DECLARATION of Gregory J. Cannata, Esq. . Document filed by Various plaintiffs represented by Cannata/Grochow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lease, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff Declarations, #3 Exhibit 3 - Dr. Morton Lippmans expert report dated June 24, 2014, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dr. Morton Lippmans Supplemental expert report dated October 20, 2014, #5 Exhibit 5 - Dr. Morton Lippmans Supplemental expert report dated October 22, 2014., #6 Exhibit 6 - Dr. Tee Guidottis expert report dated June 23, 2014., #7 Exhibit 7 - deposition transcript of Robert Serpico on behalf of Battery Park City Authority, dated May 30, 2012., #8 Exhibit 8 - deposition transcript of Christopher Horan on behalf of Trio Asbestos Removal Corp., dated August 6, 2013)(Cannata, Gregory)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8208 RESPONSE re: #8203 Order,, (Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Rule 12(d) Motion for Summary Judgment). Document filed by Various plaintiffs represented by Cannata/Grochow. (Cannata, Gregory)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8207 DECLARATION of Christopher R. LoPalo re: #8203 Order,, . Document filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Errata 23, #2 Exhibit 24, #3 Exhibit 25, #4 Exhibit 26, #5 Exhibit 27, #6 Exhibit 28, #7 Errata 29, #8 Errata 30)(LoPalo, Christopher)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8206 RESPONSE re: #8203 Order,, . Document filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC. (LoPalo, Christopher)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8205 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against HMC CAPITAL RESOURCES LLC, incorrectly named herein as HMC CAPITAL RESOURCES CORP. and/or HMC FINANCIAL CENTER, INC.; MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.; and MK WEST STREET COMPANY, L.P., incorrectly named herein as MK WEST STREET COMP ANY only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 85 West Street in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/05/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-02527-AKH(ama)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8204 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against HMC CAPITAL RESOURCES LLC, incorrectly named herein as HMC CAPITAL RESOURCES CORP. and/or HMC FINANCIAL CENTER, INC.; MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.; and MK WEST STREET COMPANY, L.P., incorrectly named herein as MK WEST STREET COMP ANY only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing,evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 85 West Street in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs., MK West Street Company, L.P. terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/05/2019). *** Party HMC Capital Resources LLC and Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. terminated. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:05-cv-09822-AKH(ama) Modified on 8/13/2019 (ama).
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8203 ORDER: The parties having presented on defendants' Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and (b)(6) motion (ECF 8106) matters outside the complaint but part of the extensive record of the 9/11 litigation (to which BPCA was a party defendant), and counsel having argued regarding such matters, the Court proposes, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(d), to treat the motion as one for summary judgment. Accordingly, the parties shall have 20 days to present any further factual materials that they consider to be relevant. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/26/2019) (ne)
July 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Oral Argument held on 7/25/2019 re: #8110 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). filed by Battery Park City Authority. (Jones, Brigitte)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8202 ORDER denying #8191 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Denied. The matter has been on the calendar for weeks, and deserves to be determined promptly. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/19/2019) (ne)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8191 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Christopher R. LoPalo dated July 18, 2019. Document filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC.(LoPalo, Christopher)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8140 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff{s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) BT Private Clients Corporation, BT Private Clients Corporation, BT Private Clinets Corp., Bankers Trust Corporation, DB Private Clients Corporation, Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Tishman Interiors Corporation, Tully Construction Co. Inc., Tully Construction Co. Inc., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Industries (Corporation), Tully Industries, Inc., BT Private Clients Corp. and BT Private Clients Corporation terminated. (ks)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8125 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Margaret H. Warner dated 6/24/2019 re: Adjourning oral argument. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered but at 2:30 p.m. (Oral Argument set for 7/25/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/25/2019) (ne)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8124 SCHEDULING ORDER: On July 25, 2019, at 11 a.m., the Court will hear oral argument the motions to dismiss filed by Battery Park City Authority at ECF Nos. 8106 and 8110. SO ORDERED. Oral Argument set for 7/25/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/21/2019) (ne)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8123 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8120 Status Report filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC. ENDORSEMENT: Accepted. The next report is due September 27, 2019. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/18/2019) (ne)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8122 JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) the Amended Complaints. . Document filed by WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc.. (Warner, Margaret)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8121 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (120 in 1:06-cv-05325-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)., (72 in 1:10-cv-04226-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)., (81 in 1:07-cv-01669-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)., (174 in 1:05-cv-03090-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)., (8110 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)., (108 in 1:06-cv-05289-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Battery Park City Authority. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Goldman, Rachel)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8195 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiffs against Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street (Two World Financial Center) in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01464-AKH (sac)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8194 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against American International Realty Corp. and American International Group, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation, and demolition operations, at the premises located at 163 Front Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-05337-AKH (sac)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8193 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Mayore Estates LLC; 80 Lafayette Associates, LLC; Mayore Estates LLC and 80 Lafayette Associates LLC as Tenants in Common; Century 21 Department Store LLC; Century 21, Inc.; Blue Millennium Realty Inc.; and Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 22 Cortlandt Street, 26 Cortlandt Street and the premises known as Century 21 (collectively, "Settlement Site") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-06863-AKH (sac)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8192 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiffs against Brookfield Office Properties Inc., Brookfield Asset Management Inc., Brookfield Properties OLP Co. LLC (f/k/a BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC), Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., Brookfield Properties One WFC Co. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. L.P.), Brookfield Properties One WFC G.P. Corp.(f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp.), WFP Tower B Co. L.P., WPP Tower B. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp.), BFP Tower C Co. LLC, BFP Tower C MM LLC, WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower D Co. G.P. Corp.) and WFP Retail Co. L.P.; Battery Park City Authority; and BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe; and Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC, only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, testing, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 200 Liberty Street ("One World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02744-AKH(sac)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8190 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against HMC CAPITAL RESOURCES LLC, incorrectly named herein as HMC CAPITAL RESOURCES CORP. and/or HMC FINANCIAL CENTER, INC.; MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.; and MK WEST STREET COMPANY, L.P., incorrectly named herein as MK WEST STREET COMP ANY only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 85 West Street in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02619-AKH (sac)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8189 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against 90 Church Street Limited Partnership; Boston Properties, Inc.; Structure Tone (UK), Inc.; Structure Tone Global Services, Inc.; Ambient Group, Inc. and Belfor Group, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 90 Church Street in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-05280-AKH (sac)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8188 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Brookfield Office Properties Inc., Brookfield Asset Management Inc., Brookfield Properties OLP Co. LLC (f/k/a BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC), Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., Brookfield Properties One WFC Co, LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. L.P.), Brookfield Properties One WFC G.P. Corp. (f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp.), WFP Tower B Co. L.P., WFP Tower B. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp.), BFP Tower C Co. LLC, BFP Tower C MM LLC, WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WPP Tower D. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower D Co. G.P. Corp.) and WFP Retail Co. L.P.; Battery Park City Authority; and BMS Catastrophe, Inc, s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe; and Hillman Entities including but not limited to Hillman Environmental Group, LLC, only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 200 Liberty Street ("One World Financial Center") New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01704-AKH (sac)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8187 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Brookfield Office Properties Inc., Brookfield Asset Management Inc., Brookfield Properties OLP Co. LLC (f/k/a BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC), Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., Brookfield Properties One WFC Co. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. L.P.), Brookfield Properties One WFC G.P. Corp.(f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp.), WFP Tower B Co. L.P.; WFP Tower B. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp.), BFP Tower C Co. LLC, BFP Tower C MM LLC, WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower D Co. G.P. Corp.) and WFP Retail Co. L.P.; Battery Park City Authority; BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe; Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC; and RBC Dain Rauscher Inc. f/k/a Tucker Anthony, Inc., arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation, and demolition operations, at the premises located at One World Financial Center (200 Liberty Street) in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-05337-AKH (sac)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8186 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against American International Realty Corp. and American International Group, Inc., and AIG Realty, Inc. arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 70 Pine Street in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-01653-AKH (sac)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8183 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiffs against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01464-AKH(sac)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8174 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Verizon New York Inc.; Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC; Milro Associates, Inc.; Pinnacle Environmental Corporation; Tishman Interiors Corporation; L VI Environmental Services Co., LVI Environmental Services Inc., LVI Services, Inc.; Syska Hennessy Group, Inc. i/s/h/a Syska and Hennessy; Bureau Veritas North America, Inc., as Successor by Merger to Clayton Group Services, Inc. f/k/a Clayton Environmental Consultants, Inc.; and William F. Collins, AIA Architects, LLP i/s/h/a William F. Collins, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation, and demolition operations, at the premises located at 140 West Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-05709-AKH (rjm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8161 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Verizon New York Inc.; Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC; Milro Associates, Inc.; Pinnacle Environmental Corporation; Tishman Interiors Corporation; LVI Environmental Services Co., LVI Environmental Services Inc., LVI Services, Inc.; Syska Hennessy Group, Inc. i/s/h/a Syska and Hennessy; Bureau Veritas North America, Inc., as Successor by Merger to Clayton Group Services, Inc. f/k/a Clayton Environmental Consultants, Inc.; and William F. Collins, AIA Architects, LLP i/s/h/a William F. Collins, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation, and demolition operations, at the premises located at 140 West Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-01514-AKH (rjm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8159 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Brookfield Office Properties Inc., Brookfield Asset Management Inc., Brookfield Properties OLP Co. LLC (f/k/a BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC), Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., Brookfield Properties One WFC Co. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. L.P.), Brookfield Properties One WFC G.P. Corp. (f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp.), WFP Tower B Co. L.P., WFP Tower B. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp.), BFP Tower C Co. LLC, BFP Tower C MM LLC, WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower D Co. G.P. Corp.) and WFP Retail Co. L.P.; BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe; and Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation, and demolition operations, at the premises located at One Liberty Plaza (165 Broadway) in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-01514-AKH (rjm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8158 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction. excavation, and demolition operations, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street (Two World Financial Center) in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:09-cv-02258-AKH (rjm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8137 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff against Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation, and demolition operations, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street (Two World Financial Center) in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:10-cv-06870-AKH (rjm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8134 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) (mro)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8133 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation, and demolition operations, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street (Two World Financial Center) in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-01514-AKH (rjm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8132 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiffs against Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation, and demolition operations, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street (Two World Financial Center) in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-05283-AKH. (rjm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8131 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation, and demolition operations, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street (Two World Financial Center) in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-05337-AKH (rjm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8120 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC.(LoPalo, Christopher)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8179 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8177 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8175 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8148 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by an between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Tully Construction Company and Tully Industries, Inc. terminated. (ks)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8135 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Bankers Trust Company, DB Private Clients Corporation, DB Private Clients Corporation, DB Private Clients Corporation, DB Private Clients Corporation, Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Interiors Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Interiors Corporation, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Interiors Corporation, Tishman Interiors Corporation, Tully Construction Co. Inc., Tully Construction Co. Inc., Tully Construction Co. Inc., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Industries, Tully Industries, Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., BT Private Clients Corp. and Bankers Trust Corporation terminated. (ks)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8201 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8200 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8199 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8198 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissa1 is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01460-AKH (sac)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8197 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients,Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-05336-AKH (sac)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8196 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in my way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01528-AKH (sac)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8185 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 l(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York,on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-05554-AKH (sac)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8184 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) (sac)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8182 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) (sac)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8181 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) (sac)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8180 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8178 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8176 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8173 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8172 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8171 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8170 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8169 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8168 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(l)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff{s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) (jca)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8167 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8166 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8165 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8164 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas ( formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and ''Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Tishman Interiors Corporation, Tully Construction Co. Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., BT Private Clients Corp. and DB Private Clients Corporation terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01546-AKH(kv)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8163 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8162 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8160 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. Deutsche Bank, Deutsche Bank, Deutsche Bank, Deutsche Bank, Deutsche Bank, Deutsche Bank, Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Deutsche Bank and Deutsche Bank terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) (kv)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8157 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs., DB Private Clients Corporation, BT Private Clients Corp. and Bankers Trust Corporation terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-05397-AKH(rj)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8156 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-05504-AKH(rro)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8155 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8154 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8153 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8152 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8151 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8150 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8149 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) (ks)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8147 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities" which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8146 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities" which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8145 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities" which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-05290-AKH(ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8144 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities" which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01677-AKH(ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8143 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities" which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01619-AKH(ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8142 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clie,nts Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) DB Private Clients Corporation, Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Tishman Interiors Corporation, Tully Construction Co. Inc., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Industries, BT Private Clients Corp. and Bankers Trust Corporation terminated.(ks)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8141 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities" which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01652-AKH(ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8139 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities" which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/03/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:05-cv-10739-AKH(ama)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8138 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) BT Private Clients Corp. and DB Private Clients Corporation terminated. (ks)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8136 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up; volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Tully Construction Co. Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., BT Private Clients Corp. and DB Private Clients Corporation terminated.(ks)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8130 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-05550-AKH(jca)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8129 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Deutsche Bank Trust Company and Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) (jca) Modified on 7/12/2019 (jca).
June 6, 2019 Filing 8128 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation. (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-03446-AKH(jca)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8127 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(l)(A)(ii): L All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients c;:orp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01694-AKH(jca)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8126 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against the "Deutsche Bank Entities," which include: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (formerly known as Bankers Trust Company), Bankers Trust Company (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation), Bankers Trust Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), Bankers Trust New York Corporation (now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation), DB Private Clients Corp. (formerly known as BT Private Clients Corp.), BT Private Clients Corp. (now known as DB Private Clients Corp.), and "Deutsche Bank Trust Company," a non-existent company named as a defendant by Plaintiff(s); and Tishman Interiors Corporation; Tully Construction Co., Inc.; and Tully Industries, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 130 Liberty Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01519-AKH(jca)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8119 DECLARATION of Christopher R. LoPalo in Opposition re: #8106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) the Amended Complaints., #8110 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Errata 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)(LoPalo, Christopher)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8118 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #8106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) the Amended Complaints., #8110 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC. (LoPalo, Christopher)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8117 DECLARATION of Gregory Cannata in Opposition re: #8106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) the Amended Complaints.. Document filed by Various plaintiffs represented by Cannata/Grochow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Cananta Hendele, Alison)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8116 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #8106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) the Amended Complaints. . Document filed by Various plaintiffs represented by Cannata/Grochow. (Cananta Hendele, Alison)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8115 DECLARATION of Robert Grochow in Opposition re: (81 in 1:07-cv-01669-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)., (8110 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)., (120 in 1:06-cv-05325-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)., (72 in 1:10-cv-04226-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)., (174 in 1:05-cv-03090-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)., (108 in 1:06-cv-05289-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Various plaintiffs represented by Cannata/Grochow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Cananta Hendele, Alison)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8114 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (120 in 1:06-cv-05325-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)., (72 in 1:10-cv-04226-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)., (81 in 1:07-cv-01669-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)., (174 in 1:05-cv-03090-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)., (8110 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)., (108 in 1:06-cv-05289-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Various plaintiffs represented by Cannata/Grochow. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Cananta Hendele, Alison)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8113 ENDORSED LETTER re: #8110 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Battery Park City Authority addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Robert Grochow dated 4/30/2019 re: briefing schedule for filed motions to dismiss. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #8110 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (Responses due by 5/28/2019, Replies due by 6/14/2019.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/1/2019) (rro)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8112 DECLARATION of Grace Condro in Support re: #8110 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Battery Park City Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - BPCA Boundary Map, #2 Exhibit B - Map of 80 Maiden Lane, #3 Exhibit C - Map of 334 Greenwich St, #4 Exhibit D - ACRIS Search, #5 Exhibit E - ACRIS Search, #6 Exhibit F - Balcer and Jastrzebowski Stipulation of Partial Discontinuance, #7 Exhibit G - Foremska Stipulation of Partial Discontinuance, #8 Exhibit H - Jastrebowski Notice of Claim)(Goldman, Rachel)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8111 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8110 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Battery Park City Authority. (Goldman, Rachel)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8110 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Document filed by Battery Park City Authority.(Goldman, Rachel)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8109 DECLARATION of David R. Biester in Support re: #8106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) the Amended Complaints.. Document filed by Battery Park City Authority, WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G)(Warner, Margaret)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8108 DECLARATION of John M. Flannery in Support re: #8106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) the Amended Complaints.. Document filed by Battery Park City Authority, WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Warner, Margaret)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8107 JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) the Amended Complaints. . Document filed by Battery Park City Authority, WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc.. (Warner, Margaret)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) the Amended Complaints. Document filed by Battery Park City Authority, WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc..(Warner, Margaret)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8105 ORDER granting (70) Motion to Substitute Party in case 1:06-cv-4376 AKH. Upon reading Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute for Deceased Plaintiff, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) Richard Buckheit, the Public Administrator of Kings County, is hereby substituted in as Plaintiff in this matter pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1). The clerk is directed to amend the caption of the complaint in this matter to reflect the same. Richard Buckheit added. Antoni Kurak terminate. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/11/2019) (ne) Modified on 5/3/2019 (ne).
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8104 ORDER granting (136) Motion to Substitute Party. It is hereby ORDERED that "Daria Janina Wszolkowska, Administrator of the Estate of Dariusz Wszolkowski" for Dariusz Wszolkowski, now deceased, as the plaintiff in this case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1), that the caption be accordingly deemed amended as indicated below, and that the Clerk is directed to reflect the amendment of the caption of the Complaint, as so indicated, to wit; as set forth herein. Daria Janina Wszolkowska added. Dariusz Wszolkowski terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/9/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-05344-AKH (mro)
February 22, 2019 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (km)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8103 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #8102 Order of Dismissal in favor of The Related Companies, L.P., The Related Realty Group, Inc., The Witkoff Group LLC, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Interiors Corporation, Toscorp. Inc., Trinity Centre LLC, Trizechahn Regional Pooling, LLC, Two Broadway LLC, UBS Financial Services, Inc., Verizon Properties Inc., Vornado Office Management, LLC'S, WFP One Liberty Plaza Co., L.P., WFP One Liberty Plaza, CO, GP, CORP., WFP Tower A Co., WFP Tower B Co., WFP Tower B Holding Co. LP, WFP Tower D Co., WFP Tower D Holding Co. II L.P., WFP Tower D Holding Co. L.L.P., WFP Tower D Holding I B.P. Corp., Wall Street, LLC, William F. Collins Architects, World Financial Properties, L.P., eagle one roofing contactors inc. against Rashid Muqaddim. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated February 22, 2019, Defendant Hillman filed and served a suggestion of death of plaintiff on February 24, 2016 (ECF 31). More than 90 days have passed, and no motion to substitute parties has been made. The case is dismissed and judgment is entered for the defendants; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 2/22/2019) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal)(km)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8102 ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE 25(a): Here, on May 18, 2018, Hillman filed and served a suggestion of death of plaintiff on February 24, 2016 (ECF 31). More than 90 days have passed, and no motion to substitute parties has been made. The case is dismissed. The clerk is instructed terminate the motion (ECF 33), enter judgment for the defendants, and close the case. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/22/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-01657-AKH(ne) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8101 ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE: This docket at one time contained thousands of claims, the vast majority of which have been settled and paid in full. On October 4, 2018, the Court ordered Plaintiffs to describe the status of Jan Pyziak's case and otherwise show why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) (ECF 7914). See In re World Trade Ctr. Disaster Site Litig., 722 F.3d 483, 486 (2d Cir. 2013). In Plaintiff's Counsel represented in its November 28, 2018 letter that Mr. Pyziak remains unresponsive after repeated attempts to contact him (ECF 8083). This case is dismissed. The Clerk shall mark the case closed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/22/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-12425-AKH(ne)
February 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Battery Park City Authority answer due 4/22/2019; WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc. answer due 4/22/2019. (ne)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8100 ORDER granting #8099 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/20/2019) (ne)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8099 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to complaints filed pursuant to the Court's January 17, 2019 Order addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Rachel B. Goldman dated February 20, 2019. Document filed by Battery Park City Authority.(Goldman, Rachel)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8098 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8097 Letter filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/14/2019) (ne)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8097 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Christopher LoPalo dated February 13, 2019 re: Extension Request. Document filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC.(LoPalo, Christopher)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8096 ORDER REGULATING PROCEEDINGS: My order of January 17, 2019 is modified to this extent: Plaintiffs shall allege the dates of prior settlements, with whom they settled, and the dates of settlement payments. Pending further order, the amounts of settlement should not be stated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/30/2019) (ne)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8095 ORDER REGULATING PROCEEDINGS: In view of the January 18, 2019 report submitted by Plaintiffs' Counsel, see ECF 8092, the status conference scheduled for February 7, 2019 is cancelled. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/30/2019) (ne)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8094 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Gregory J. Cannata, Robert A. Grochow, Margaret H. Warner, Rachel B. Goldman and John M. Flannery dated 1/28/19 re: BPCA New Long Form Complaints, 21MC102 (AKH) : Allegation concerning prior settlement amounts. Document filed by Various plaintiffs represented by Cannata/Grochow.(Grochow, Robert)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8093 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8092 Status Report filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks counsel for this report. The next update report will be due June 13, 2019. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/24/2019) (ne)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8092 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC.(LoPalo, Christopher)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8091 ORDER REGULATING PROCEEDINGS denying #7833 Motion to Dismiss; denying #7841 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. BPCA's motions to dismiss and for judgment on the pleadings are denied as premature. Oral argument scheduled for January 24, 2019 is unnecessary and is cancelled. The clerk is instructed to terminate the motions (ECF 7833, 7841). (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/17/2019) (ne)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8090 ORDER granting #7837 WTC CAPTIVES MOTION to INTERVENE; granting #7839 Motion for Joinder. The WTC Captive's motion to intervene and motion for joinder are granted. Accordingly, the clerk is instructed to terminate the motions (ECF 7837, 7839). (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/15/2019) (js)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8089 Costs Taxed as to (7476 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 64 in 1:10-cv-04226-AKH) USCA Mandate, USCA Case Number 15-2181(L), 15-2283(Con.), 15-2285(Con.), 15-2847(Con.), 15-2506(Con.), 15-2687(Con.). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that costs are taxed in favor of Appellant the State of New York in the amount of $4139.04. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that costs are taxed in favor of Appellants Santiago Alvear, Mary Ann Curley and Peter Curley in the amount of $1475.40. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that costs are taxed in favor of Appellants Ruben Acosta, Vladmir Akoulov, Waldemar Balcer, Joaquin Campuzano, Henryk Ciborowski, Jan Dobrowolski, Stanislaw Faltynowicz, Lucyna Foremska, Marek Glowaty, Eugeniusz Jastrzebowski, Zbigniew Kucharski, Maria Moreno, Irena Perzynaska, Marian Retelski, Dariusz Wszolkowski and Boguslaw Zalewski in the amount of $1186.60, and against Appellee Battery Park City Authority, et al. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:10-cv-04226-AKH. (tp)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8088 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Abbie Eliasberg Fuchs dated 12/10/2018 re: Counsel requests that the Court adjourn the status conference currently scheduled for December 17, 2018 at 12:00 pm. Plaintiffs' Counsel consented to the adjournment. Counsel is available to appear on February 6, 2019 or February 7, 2019 for the status conference. ENDORSEMENT: The status conference is adjourned to Feb. 7, 2019 at 2:30 pm. So ordered., (Status Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/11/2018) (js)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8087 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8083 Status Report filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC. ENDORSEMENT: Dismiss case. 1. The complaint by Jan Pyziak (no. 2, below) will be dismissed by separate order. 2. The clerk shall mark cases 7, 8, 11, 13 and 15 closed. No further reporting on the cases is required. 3. Plaintiff shall report on the remaining open cases on Jan 18, 2019. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/29/2018) (ne)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8086 ORDER in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH; granting (112) Motion to Substitute Party. Upon reading Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Plaintiff, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) Gabriela Perez, in her capacity as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edgar Avila is substituted in as the Primary Plaintiff pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1). The clerk is directed to amend the caption of the complaint in this matter to reflect the same. SO ORDERED. Gabriela Perez and Gabriela Perez added. Edgar Avila terminated in case 1:07-cv-01464-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/29/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01464-AKH (ne)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8085 ORDER in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH; granting (92) Motion to Substitute Party. Upon reading Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint a Representative of the Estate, Substitute Plaintiff and Compromise Settlements, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) Dennis Vanfechtmann, in his capacity as the Administrator of the Estate of Edward Vanfechtmann, is substituted in as the Primary Plaintiff pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1). The clerk is directed to amend the caption of the complaint in this matter to reflect the same. SO ORDERED. Edward VanFechtmann terminated in case 1:07-cv-01719-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/29/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01719-AKH (ne)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8084 ORDER in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH; granting (57) Motion to Substitute Party. Upon reading Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint a Representative of the Estate, Substitute Plaintiff and Compromise Settlements, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) Edelmira Feliz, as the surviving spouse of Delio Feliz, is substituted in as the Primary Plaintiff pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1). The clerk is directed to amend the caption of the complaint in this matter to reflect the same. SO ORDERED. Delio A. Feliz terminated in case 1:08-cv-02619-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/29/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02619-AKH (ne)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8083 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC.(LoPalo, Christopher)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8082 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Concerned Parties from Brigitte Jones, Courtroom Deputy by Order of Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein dated 11/21/2018 re: You are hereby notified that you are required to appear for an oral argument. Date: January 24, 2019 Time: 11:00 am Place: U.S. Courthouse - Southern District of New York 500 Pearl Street Courtroom 14D New York, New York 10007 It is ORDERED that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel involved in this case and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Oral Argument set for 1/24/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/26/2018) (ne)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8081 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Concerned Parties from Brigitte Jones, Courtroom Deputy by Order of Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein dated 11/21/2018 re: The status conference previously set for 12/4/2018 is hereby adjourned. You are hereby notified that you are required to appear for a status conf. Date: December 17, 2018 Time: 12:00 p.m. Place: U.S. Courthouse - Southern District of New York 500 Pearl Street Courtroom 14D New York, New York 10007 It is ORDERED that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel involved in this case and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Status Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/26/2018) (ne)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8067 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a redacted transcript proceeding held on 7/18/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8066 Redaction of #7507 Transcript,, (McGuirk, Kelly)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8080 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Brookfield Office Properties Inc., Brookfield Asset Management Inc., Brookfield Properties OLP Co. LLC (f/k/a BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC), Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., Brookfield Properties One WFC Co, LLC (f/k/a WPP Tower A Co. L.P.), Brookfield Properties One WFC G.P. Corp. (f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp.), WFP Tower B Co. L.P., WFP Tower B. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WPP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp.), BFP Tower C Co. LLC, BFP Tower C MM LLC, WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower D Co. G.P. Corp.) and WFP Retail Co. L.P.; Battery Park City Authority; and BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe; and Hillman Entities including but not limited to Hillman Environmental Group, LLC, only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 200 Liberty Street ("One World Financial Center") New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-07911-AKH(ne)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8079 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties, that pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Brookfield Office Properties Inc., Brookfield Asset Management Inc., Brookfield Properties OLP Co. LLC (f/k/a BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC), Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., Brookfield Properties One WFC Co. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. L.P.), Brookfield Properties One WFC G.P. Corp.(f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp.), WFP Tower B Co. L.P., WFP Tower B. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp.), BFP Tower C Co. LLC, BFP Tower C MM LLC, WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower D Co. G.P. Corp.) and WFP Retail Co. L.P.; Battery Park City Authority; and BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe; and Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC, only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, testing, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 200 Liberty Street ("One World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02720-AKH(mro) Modified on 11/16/2018 (mro).
November 14, 2018 Filing 8078 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against RBC Dain Rauscher Inc. f/k/a Tucker Anthony, Inc., only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at One World Financial Center (200 Liberty Street) in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02690-AKH(mro)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8077 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiffs against Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street (Two World Financial Center) in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02690-AKH(mro)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8076 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiffs against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02690-AKH(mro)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8075 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against RBC Dain Rauscher Inc. f/k/a Tucker Anthony, Inc., only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at One World Financial Center (200 Liberty Street) in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02720-AKH(mro)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8074 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Piaintiff(s) against RBC Dain Rauscher Inc. f/k/a Tucker Anthony, Inc., only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at One World Financial Center ("200 Liberty Street") New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-07911-AKH(ne)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8073 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiffs against 90 Church Street Limited Partnership; Boston Properties, Inc.; Structure Tone (UK), Inc.; Structure Tone Global Services, Inc.; Ambient Group, Inc. and Belfor Group, Inc., only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation, and demolition operations, at the premises located at 90 Church Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-10070-AKH(ne)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8072 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Brookfield Office Properties Inc., Brookfield Asset Management Inc., Brookfield Properties OLP Co. LLC (f/k/a BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC), Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., Brookfield Properties One WFC Co. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. L.P.), Brookfield Properties One WFCG.P. Corp. (f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp.), WFP Tower B Co. L.P., WFP Tower B. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp.), BFP Tower C Co. LLC, BFP Tower C MM LLC, WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WPP Tower D Co. G.P. Corp.) and WFP Retail Co. L.P.; Battery Park City Authority; and BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe; and Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC, only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, testing, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 200 Liberty Street ("One World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/2018) (ama)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8071 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against RBC Dain Rauscher Inc. f/k/a Tucker Anthony, Inc., only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at One World Financial Center (200 Liberty Street) in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/2018) (ama)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8070 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiffs against Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recoveryoperations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street (Two World Financial Center) in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/2018) (ama)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8069 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiffs against 90 Church Street Limited Partnership; Boston Properties, Inc.; Structure Tone (UK), Inc.; Structure Tone Global Services, Inc.; Ambient Group, Inc. and Belfor Group, Inc., only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation, and demolition operations, at the premises located at 90 Church Street in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/2018) (ama)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8068 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Brookfield Office Properties Inc., Brookfield Asset Management Inc., Brookfield Properties OLP Co. LLC (f/k/a BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC), Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., Brookfield Properties One WFC Co. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. L.P.), Brookfield Properties One WFCG.P. Corp. (f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp.), WFP Tower B Co. L.P., WFP Tower B. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp.), BFP Tower C Co. LLC, BFP Tower C MM LLC, WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WPP Tower D Co. G.P. Corp.) and WFP Retail Co. L.P.; Battery Park City Authority; and BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe; and Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC, only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, testing, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 200 Liberty Street ("One World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed withprejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/2018) (ama)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8065 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7841 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . . Document filed by Battery Park City Authority. (Goldman, Rachel)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8064 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7837 MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc.. (Warner, Margaret)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8063 JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7833 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. . Document filed by WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc.. (Warner, Margaret)
November 7, 2018 Transmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re: #8061 USCA Mandate. (nd)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8061 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #6172 Corrected Notice of Appeal, filed by Worby Groner Edelman & Napoli Bern, LLP, #6173 Notice of Appeal filed by Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman. USCA Case Number 16-1862(L); 16-1874 (con). Intervenor-Appellant moves, unopposed, for summary reversal of the district court's dismissal of the Appellants' action, in light of this Courts recent decision in In re World Trade Center Lower Manhattan Disaster Site Litigation, 2d Cir. 15-2181 (L), 892 F.3d 108, 112 (2d Cir. 2018). Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, the judgment of the district court is VACATED, and the case is REMANDED for further proceedings.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 11/7/2018. (nd)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8060 RESPONSE re: #8026 Status Report . Document filed by Harris Beach Settlement Administrator for AIG-Related Settlements, Settlement Administrator for Certain Settlements. (Eliasberg Fuchs, Abbie)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8059 DECLARATION of Christopher R. LoPalo in Opposition re: #7837 MOTION to Intervene ., #7833 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Errata 3, #4 Errata 4, #5 Errata 5, #6 Errata 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Errata 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)(LoPalo, Christopher)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8058 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #7837 MOTION to Intervene ., #7833 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. . Document filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC. (LoPalo, Christopher)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8055 DECLARATION of Robert A. Grochow, Esq. in Opposition re: (7841 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings .. Document filed by Various plaintiffs represented by Cannata/Grochow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint filed in New York State Supreme Court, #2 Exhibit Stipulation of Discontinuance filed in 05-cv-08499, #3 Exhibit Complaint filed on June 14, 2007 in the Balcer matter, Docket 06-cv-05325 (AKH), #4 Exhibit Summons and Initiating complaint filed on September 13, 2010, in the Balcer matter, Docket 06-cv-05325 (AKH), #5 Exhibit General Order Sua Sponte Dismissing Complaints, filed October 14, 2010, #6 Exhibit Amended Complaint filed on June 27, 2011, in the Balcer matter, Docket 06-cv-05325 (AKH), #7 Exhibit Summons and Initiating Complaint filed on September 9, 2010 in the Jastrzebowski matter, Docket 06-cv-5289 (AKH), #8 Exhibit Amended Complaint filed on June 27, 2011 in the Jastrzebowski matter, Docket 06-cv-5289 (AKH), #9 Exhibit Summons and Initiating Complaint filed on September 13, 2010 in the Ciborowski matter, Docket 10-cv-4226 (AKH), #10 Exhibit November 9, 2010 letter so ordered, dismissing additional complaints in line with the October 14, 2010 order, #11 Exhibit Amended Complaint filed on January 21, 2011, in the Ciborowski matter, Docket 10-cv-4226 (AKH), #12 Exhibit N.Y. Bill Jacket, 2009 A.B. 7122, Ch. 440 (March 20, 2009))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Grochow, Robert)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8054 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (7841 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . . Document filed by Various plaintiffs represented by Cannata/Grochow. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Grochow, Robert)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8053 DECLARATION of Gregory J. Cannata, Esq. in Opposition re: #7833 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Various plaintiffs represented by Cannata/Grochow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lease between BPCA, City of New York and NYC Board of Education, #2 Exhibit Transcript of August 12, 2015 Conference in 21 MC 102 Docket, #3 Exhibit Relevant Section of the Settlement Plan, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A of the Settlement Plan)(Grochow, Robert)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8052 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #7833 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. . Document filed by Various plaintiffs represented by Cannata/Grochow. (Grochow, Robert)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8026 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC.(LoPalo, Christopher)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7997 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #7996 Letter filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #7996 Letter, #7837 MOTION to Intervene. #7833 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. #7839 MOTION for Joinder to Defendant Battery Park City Authority's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. #7841 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings: Responses due by 10/29/2018, Replies due by 11/14/2018.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/22/2018) (ne)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7996 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Christopher LoPalo dated 10/22/2018 re: Extension Request. Document filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC.(LoPalo, Christopher)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7984 TRUE COPY ORDER of USCA as to #6172 Corrected Notice of Appeal, filed by Worby Groner Edelman & Napoli Bern, LLP, #6173 Notice of Appeal filed by Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman. USCA Case Number 16-1862(L); 16-1874 (con). Intervenor-Appellant moves, unopposed, for summary reversal of the district court's dismissal of the Appellants' action, in light of this Court's recent decision in In re World Trade Center Lower Manhattan Disaster Site Litigation, 2d Cir. 15-2181 (L), 892 F.3d 108, 112 (2d Cir. 2018). Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, the judgment of the district court is VACATED, and the case is REMANDED for further proceedings.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 10/17/2018. (nd)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7949 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Kimberly A. Connick dated 9/4/2018 re: Settlement Administrator hereby requests that the Court approve redaction of a portion of page 23, line 22 of the transcript. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/12/2018) (ne)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7947 ORDER in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH; granting (76) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:07-cv-05360-AKH. Upon reading Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute for Deceased Plaintiff, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) Jasmin April Hernandez, daughter and Administratrix of the Decedent's Estate, is hereby substituted in as Plaintiff in this matter pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1). The clerk is directed to amend the caption of the complaint in this matter to reflect the same. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/10/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-05360-AKH (ne)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7946 ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE: On September 27, 2018, the Court held a status conference to address unconsummated settlements in the 21 MC 102 docket. The docket at one time contained several thousand of these claims, the vast majority of which have been settled and paid in full. Despite numerous requests by Plaintiff Rodrigo Barros' counsel, Mr. Barros declined to sign the release and related papers necessary to settle. On July 20, 2018, I ordered Plaintiff to show cause, by written submission no later than September 18, 2018, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) (Dkt. Nos. 7500-7504). Plaintiff defaulted. This case is dismissed. The Clerk shall mark the case closed. However, plaintiff has leave, for 30 days from the date of this order, to petition the Court to reopen the case for the purpose of executing the remaining papers necessary to effectuate a settlement. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/10/2018) (ne)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7945 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 9/27/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7944 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 9/27/2018 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Griffing, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/8/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7943 ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE: On September 27, 2018, the Court held a status conference to address unconsummated settlements in the 21 MC 102 docket, including this case. This docket at one time contained thousands of these claims, the vast majority of which have been settled and paid in full. On July 20, 2018, the Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause, by written submission no later than September 18, 2018, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute under Fed. R. Civ,. P. 41(b) (Dkt. Nos. 7500-7504). Despite numerous attempts by Plaintiff's counsel to contact Plaintiff, he remains missing or unresponsive. This case is dismissed. The Clerk shall mark the case closed. SO ORDERED. Andrzej Siemek terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/10/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01704-AKH(ne)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7942 ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE: On September 27, 2018, the Court held a status conference to address unconsummated settlements in the 21 MC 102 docket, including this case. This docket at one time contained thousands of these claims, the vast majority of which have been settled and paid in full. On July 20, 2018, the Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause, by written submission no later than September 18, 2018, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) (Dkt. Nos. 7500-7504). Despite numerous attempts by Plaintiff's counsel to contact Plaintiff, he remains missing or unresponsive. This case is dismissed. The Clerk shall mark the case closed. SO ORDERED. Osman Juarez terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/10/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-04970-AKH(ne)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7941 ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE: On September 27, 2018, the Court held a status conference to address unconsummated settlements in the 21 MC 102 docket, including this case. This docket at one time contained thousands of these claims, the vast majority of which have been settled and paid in full. On July 20, 2018, the Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause, by written submission no later than September 18, 2018, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) (Dkt. Nos. 7500-7504). Despite numerous attempts by Plaintiff's counsel to contact Plaintiff, he remains missing or unresponsive. This case is dismissed. The Clerk shall mark the case closed. SO ORDERED. Tony Jones terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/10/2018) (ne)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7925 ORDER: Upon reading Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute for Deceased Plaintiff, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) Luis Hernando Alvarez, son of the Decedent and Administrator of the Estate, is hereby substituted in as Plaintiff in this matter pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1). The clerk is directed to amend the caption of the complaint in this matter to reflect the same. SO ORDERED. Luis Hernando Alvarez and Luis Hernando Alvarez added. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/5/2018) (ne)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7924 ORDER: Upon reading Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute for Deceased Plaintiff, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) Lois M. Rosenblatt, Public Administrator of Queens County, is hereby substituted in as Plaintiff in this matter pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1). The clerk is directed to amend the caption of the complaint in this matter to reflect the same. SO ORDERED. Lois M. Rosenblatt added. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/5/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02639-AKH(ne)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7923 ORDER: Upon reading Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute for Deceased Plaintiff, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) Janina Kolodziejczyk, spouse of the Decedent, is hereby substituted in as Plaintiff in this matter pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1). The clerk is directed to amend the caption of the complaint in this matter to reflect the same. SO ORDERED. Janina Kolodziejczyk and Janina Kolodziejczyk added. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/5/2018) (ne)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7922 ORDER: Upon reading Plaintiff's Motion jubstitute for Deceased Plaintiff, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) Genowefa Kaleta-Lech, spouse of the Decedent, is hereby substituted in as Plaintiff in this matter pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1). The clerk is directed to amend the caption of the complaint in this matter to reflect the same. SO ORDERED. Genowefa Kaleta-Lech and Genowefa Kaleta-Lech added. Genowefa Lech terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/5/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-07911-AKH(ne)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7921 ORDER: Upon reading Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute for Deceased Plaintiff, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) Lois M. Rosenblatt, the Public Administrator of Queens County, is hereby substituted in as Plaintiff in this matter pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1). The clerk is directed to amend the caption of the complaint in this matter to reflect the same. SO ORDERED. Lois M. Rosenblatt and Lois M. Rosenblatt added. Jimena Solis terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/5/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01541-AKH(ne)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7920 ORDER: Upon reading Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute for Deceased Plaintiff, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) Jasmin April Hernandez, daughter and Administratrix of the Decedent's Estate, is hereby substituted in as Plaintiff in this matter pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(l). The clerk is directed to amend the caption of the complaint in this matter to reflect the same. SO ORDERED. Jasmin April Hernandez and Jasmin April Hernandez added. Enrique Hernandez terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/5/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-05360-AKH(ne)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7914 ORDER REGULATING PROCEEDINGS: Based on representations of Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs shall provide a report, no later than October, 24, 2018, describing the status of the following cases: Isaac Hernandez; 05 CV 01379 Wilson Valdez; 07 CV 1541 Rey R. Campoverde; 07 CV 05280 Pedro Ponce; 08 CV 02690 Antoni Castillo; 09 CV 3449 Joe Starace; 07 CV 8949 Walter Marin; 07 CV 10070 Joseph Mills; 08 CV 2329 Freddy Jaramillo; 08 CV 02639 Anthony Shubert; 07 CV 01532. In the aforementioned cases of Edward Vanfechtmann, 07 CV 01719; Andrzej Kasina, 07 CV 01636; Delio Feliz, 08 CV 02619; Carmen Padilla, 05 CV 09822; and Manual Sanabia, 08 CV 0686, Plaintiffs' Counsel requested that the Court intervene and contact other courts. These requests are inappropriate at this time and are thus denied. The next status conference shall occur on December 4, 2018, at 11 a.m. SO ORDERED (As further set forth in this order) (Status Conference set for 12/4/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/4/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(ne)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7868 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH; granting (100) Motion to Substitute Party. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Wilson Valdez terminated in case 1:07-cv-01541-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01541-AKH (ne) Modified on 2/7/2019 (ne).
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7867 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH; granting (63) Motion to Substitute Party. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. America Peralta and America Peralta added. Guido Peralta terminated in case 1:07-cv-01513-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01513-AKH (ne)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7866 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH; granting (82) Motion to Substitute Party. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Leszek Lech terminated in case 1:06-cv-07911-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-07911-AKH (ne) Modified on 2/7/2019 (ne).
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7865 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH; granting (46) Motion to Substitute Party. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Freddy Jaramillo terminated in case 1:08-cv-02639-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02639-AKH (ne) Modified on 2/7/2019 (ne).
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7864 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH; granting (95) Motion to Substitute Party. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Richard Buckheit and Richard Buckheit added. Andrzej Kasina terminated in case 1:07-cv-01636-AKH (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01636-AKH (ne)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7863 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (56 in 07-cv-11016) Motion to Substitute Party. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/27/2018) (ne)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7862 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (86 in 07-cv-4479) SECOND MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Wieslaw Kolodziejczyk, New Party: Janina Kolodziejczyk. Document filed by Janina Kolodziejczyk(as personal representative of The Estate of Wieslaw Kolodziejczyk), Janina Kolodziejczyk(Individually), Wieslaw Kolodziejczyk.(LoPalo, Christopher). ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/27/2018) (ne)
September 27, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Status Conference held on 9/27/2018, ( Status Conference set for 12/5/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.). (Court Reporter Steve Griffing) (Jones, Brigitte)
September 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/22/2018. Replies due by 11/7/2018. (ne)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7859 ORDER granting #7857 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/26/2018) (ne)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7857 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to the motions of BPCA and the WTC Captive addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Robert A. Grochow, Esq. and Gregory J. Cannata, Esq. dated 9-25-18. Document filed by Various plaintiffs represented by Cannata/Grochow.(Grochow, Robert)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7846 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MARGARET H. WARNER granting #7832 Motion for Margaret H. Warner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/25/2018) (ne)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7843 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7841 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . . Document filed by Battery Park City Authority. (Goldman, Rachel)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7842 DECLARATION of Grace Condro in Support re: #7841 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings .. Document filed by Battery Park City Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter, dated July 2, 2018, #2 Exhibit B - Map of BPCA Project Area, #3 Exhibit C - Map of 80 Maiden Lane, #4 Exhibit D - Map of 334 Greenwich Street, #5 Exhibit Stipulation of Partial Discontinuance, #6 Exhibit F - Stipulation of Partial Discontinuance, #7 Exhibit G - Plaintiff Jastrzebowski Notice of Claim, #8 Exhibit Stipulation of Partial Discontinuance)(Goldman, Rachel)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7841 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Document filed by Battery Park City Authority.(Goldman, Rachel)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7840 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Grace Elizabeth Condro on behalf of Battery Park City Authority. (Condro, Grace)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7839 MOTION for Joinder to Defendant Battery Park City Authority's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. Document filed by WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc..(Warner, Margaret)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7838 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7837 MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc.. (Warner, Margaret)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7837 MOTION to Intervene . Document filed by WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc..(Warner, Margaret)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7836 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7833 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. . Document filed by Battery Park City Authority. (Goldman, Rachel)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7835 DECLARATION of David R. Biester in Support re: #7833 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Battery Park City Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F - May 7, 2018 Letter, #2 Exhibit G - List of Stuyvesant Plaintiffs)(Goldman, Rachel)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7834 DECLARATION of John M. Flannery in Support re: #7833 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Battery Park City Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement of Lease between BPCA and Board of Education of the City of New York, #2 Exhibit B - Transcript of R. Serpico Deposition, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Bernard Orlan, #4 Exhibit D - List of Stuyvesant Plaintiffs, #5 Exhibit E - Production Letters)(Goldman, Rachel)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7833 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. Document filed by Battery Park City Authority.(Goldman, Rachel)
September 24, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7832 MOTION for Margaret H. Warner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15608571. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7832 MOTION for Margaret H. Warner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15608571. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Warner, Margaret)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7806 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC.(LoPalo, Christopher)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7775 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring- Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation, and demolition operations, at the premises located at Three World Financial Center (200 Vesey Street) in New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs., Blackmon-Mooring Steamatic Catastophe, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/20/2018) (rj)
September 10, 2018 Filing 7762 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street (Two World Financial Center) in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/20/2018) (jwh)
September 10, 2018 Filing 7749 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against 233 Broadway Owners, LLC only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 233 Broadway in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/20/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02246-AKH(jwh)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7680 ORDER in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH; terminating (121) Motion to Compel in case 1:06-cv-02527-AKH; terminating (128) Motion to Compel in case 1:07-cv-05299-AKH; terminating (81) Motion to Compel in case 1:08-cv-04940-AKH. Each of the above-captioned cases contain open motions, filed on February 23, 2018, to compel settlement payments. Since the motions were filed, the parties notified the Court that each of the settlements had been paid. Accordingly, the clerk is instructed to terminate the motions (ECF 121, 128, and 81, respectively). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/23/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-02527-AKH, 1:07-cv-05299-AKH, 1:08-cv-04940-AKH (anc)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7678 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Brookfield Office Properties Inc., Brookfield Asset Management Inc., Brookfield Properties OLP Co. LLC (f/k/a BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC), Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., Brookfield Properties One WFC Co. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. L.P.), Brookfield Properties One WFC G.P. Corp.(f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp.), WFP Tower B Co. L.P., WFP Tower B. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp.), BFP Tower C Co. LLC, BFP Tower C MM LLC, WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower D Co. G.P. Corp.) and WFP Retail Co. L.P.; Battery Park City Authority; and BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe; and Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC, only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, testing, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 200 Liberty Street ("One World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/7/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01605-AKH(jwh)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7677 AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiffs are ordered to show cause, by written submission filed no later than September 18, 2018, why their case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute under Federal Rule 41(b). If plaintiffs fail to complete their settlement paperwork by September 18, 2018, their claims will be subject to dismissal for failure to prosecute unless plaintiffs can demonstrate meaningful progress towards resolving their various estate administration issues. See In re World Trade Ctr. Disaster Site Litig., 722 F.3d 483, 486 (2d Cir. 2013). The clerk is instructed to terminate the motions (ECF 46, 54, 82, 72, 56, 56, 101, and 66). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/23/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(anc)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7669 SCHEDULING ORDER: Having received the Mandate of the Court of Appeals on June 29, 2018, the parties in the outstanding Battery Park City Authority ("BPCA") cases appeared before the Court for a status conference on July 18, 2018. At the conference, the parties raised a new dispute: whether the remaining plaintiffs had previously settled their claims against BPCA by entering into a settlement with the WTC Captive and its Insureds in a 2010 Final Settlement Agreement. After hearing the parties' respective positions, the Court ordered the parties to submit a joint letter laying out the factual history of the remaining cases, and the parties did so on August 20, 2018 (ECF 7636, 7637). The parties are ordered to set up the issues presented by the parties' joint letter by a proper motion supported by relevant documents introduced by affidavits and supported by memoranda. Since BPCA is the initiating party, it shall file such a motion with supporting papers by September 24, 2018. The WTC Captive Insurance Fund may move to intervene by filing its motion at the same time, coordinating its points with BPCA and, to the extent not covered by BPCA's papers, file papers of its own. All opposition papers shall be filed by October 8, 2018. All reply papers shall be filed by October 19, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 9/24/2018. Responses due by 10/8/2018. Replies due by 10/19/2018.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/22/2018) (ne)
August 21, 2018 Filing 7651 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-05336-AKH(mro)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7637 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Margaret H. Warner dated August 20, 2018 re: In re World Trade Ctr. Lower Manhattan Disaster Site Litig. - Plaintiffs with Pending Suits Represented by Mr. Cannata and Mr. Grochow. Document filed by WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 WTC Captive-BPCA Exhibit A, #4 WTC Captive-BPCA Exhibit B, #5 BPCA Exhibit C, #6 BPCA Exhibit D)(Warner, Margaret)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7636 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Margaret H. Warner dated August 20, 2018 re: In re World Trade Ctr. Lower Manhattan Disaster Site Litigation. Document filed by WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 WTC Captive-BPCA Exhibit A, #2 WTC Captive-BPCA Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(Warner, Margaret)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7622 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC.(LoPalo, Christopher)
August 2, 2018 Filing 7531 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Brookfield Office Properties Inc., Brookfield Asset Management Inc., Brookfield Properties OLP Co. LLC (f/k/a BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC), Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, LP., Brookfield Properties One WFC Co. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. L.P.), Brookfield Properties One WFC G.P. Corp.(f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp.), WFP Tower B Co. L.P., WFP Tower B. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp.), BFP Tower C Co. LLC, BFP Tower C MM LLC, WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower D Co. G.P. Corp.) and WFP Retail Co. L.P.; Battery Park City Authority; and BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe; and Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC, only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, testing, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 200 Liberty Street ("One World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 06/07/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-02814-AKH(tn)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7509 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENTS IN 2 CASES: By Order dated July 25, 2014, I held that all settlements in the 21-mc-102 docket would be subject to review by this Court for fairness and reasonableness. Now before the Court is a letter motion for approval of settlements for two plaintiffs represented by Sanders, Sanders, Block, Woycik, Viener & Grossman, P.C. Accordingly, the motion to approve the settlements is GRANTED. The Clerk shall mark the motion (ECF No. 12) terminated. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/30/2018) (cf) Modified on 10/15/2018 (cf).
July 27, 2018 Filing 7508 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/18/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 27, 2018 Filing 7507 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/18/2018 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/17/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 26, 2018 Filing 8041 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/26/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01546-AKH (yv)
July 26, 2018 Filing 7938 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/26/2018) (ama)
July 26, 2018 Filing 7937 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/26/2018) (ama)
July 26, 2018 Filing 7936 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, me. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal ofdocuments and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/26/2018) (ama)
July 26, 2018 Filing 7935 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located al 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/26/2018) (ama)
July 26, 2018 Filing 7934 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/26/2018) (ama)
July 26, 2018 Filing 7933 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/26/2018) (ama)
July 26, 2018 Filing 7931 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, Blackmon arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including. but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/26/2018) (ama)
July 26, 2018 Filing 7930 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/26/2018) (ama)
July 26, 2018 Filing 7929 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, In,c. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("FourWorld Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/26/2018) (ama)
July 26, 2018 Filing 7928 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/26/2018) (ama)
July 26, 2018 Filing 7927 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/26/2018) (ama)
July 26, 2018 Filing 7809 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Libe1ty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/26/2018) (ama)
July 26, 2018 Filing 7667 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs., Weston Solutions, Inc., Weston Solutions, Inc., Weston Solutions, Inc., Weston Solutions, Inc. and Weston Solutions, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/26/2018) (rj)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8051 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(l )(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring- Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-04493-AKH(js)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8050 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(l )(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring- Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. So Ordered ( (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-05397-AKH(js)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8049 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8048 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8047 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8046 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8044 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8043 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8040 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8039 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8038 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018)(Doc. filed in case 21mc102). (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8037 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8036 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8034 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8032 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8031 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8017 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs., (Weston Solutions, Inc. terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-15116-AKH(yv)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8016 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. Weston Solutions, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01628-AKH. (mml)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8015 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs., (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8013 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. Weston Solutions Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-11025-AKH. (mml)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8012 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs., (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8010 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs., (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8009 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastophe, Inc. and Weston Solutions, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:05-cv-02501-AKH. (mml)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8008 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs., (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8007 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs., (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8006 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8005 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs., (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8004 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs., (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8003 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8000 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs., (Weston Solutions, Inc. terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-11458-AKH(yv)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7999 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02674-AKH(jwh)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7998 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-05305-AKH(jwh)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7995 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs., (Weston Solutions, Inc. terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-04518-AKH (yv)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7994 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7993 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7992 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7991 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiffs against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7990 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7989 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7988 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7987 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7986 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7985 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama) Modified on 10/18/2018 (ama).
July 25, 2018 Filing 7983 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs., (Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastophe, Inc. and Weston Solutions, Inc. terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:09-cv-03455-AKH (yv)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7982 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7981 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7980 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7979 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7978 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7977 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7976 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7969 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs., (Weston Solutions, Inc. terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02248-AKH (yv)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7965 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02672-AKH(jwh)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7964 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02671-AKH(jwh) Modified on 10/15/2018 (jwh).
July 25, 2018 Filing 7962 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/b/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/h/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September' 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-02221-AKH(jwh)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7961 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7959 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7958 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02618-AKH(rro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7957 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02617-AKH(rro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7956 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7955 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)( ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02669-AKH(jwh)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7954 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (jwh)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7953 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-11257-AKH(anc)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7952 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-05786-AKH(anc)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7951 STIPULATION VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs., (Weston Solutions, Inc. terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01537-AKH(yv)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7950 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs., (Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastope, Inc. and Weston Solutions, Inc. terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-12826-AKH(yv)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7948 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs., (Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastophe, Inc. and Weston Solutions, Inc. terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01712-AKH (yv)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7940 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(l )(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring- Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-01786-AKH(js)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7939 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(l )(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring- Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-14824-AKH(js)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7932 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7926 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7919 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs., (Weston Solutions, Inc. terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01708-AKH(yv)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7918 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:05-cv-01675-AKH(anc)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7917 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs., (Weston Solutions, Inc. terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02635-AKH(yv)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7916 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. Weston Solutions, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-02884-AKH. (mml)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7915 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT TS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. Weston Solutions, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-05556-AKH. (mml)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7909 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(l )(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring- Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-04485-AKH(js)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7907 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (jwh)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7905 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02615-AKH(rro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7903 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02613-AKH(rro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7902 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01493-AKH(rro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7899 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01604-AKH(rro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7897 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02609-AKH(rro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7896 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-05286-AKH(rro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7894 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(1) (A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-14620-AKH(rro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7892 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in' any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02243-AKH(jwh)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7891 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01667-AKH(jwh)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7890 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (jwh)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7886 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-04484-AKH(mro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7884 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01652-AKH(mro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7883 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01649-AKH(mro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7875 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs., (Weston Solutions, Inc. ((Agent/Contractor)) terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-05353-AKH (yv)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7873 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(l )(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring- Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01648-AKH(js)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7872 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastophe, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:05-cv-01636-AKH. (mml)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7871 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(l )(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring- Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01647-AKH(js)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7860 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(l )(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring- Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:05-cv-09333-AKH(js)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7854 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7853 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7852 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7851 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7850 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(l )(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-05300-AKH(js)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7849 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7848 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7847 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(l )(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:09-cv-02809-AKH(js)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7828 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7827 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7826 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. and Weston Solutions, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7825 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7822 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7819 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal ofdocuments and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7818 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Libe1ty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7814 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiffs against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7813 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018). (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7812 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018). (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7811 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02595-AKH(mro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7810 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:05-cv-10743-AKH(mro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7808 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal ofdocuments and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7807 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7805 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02593-AKH(mro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7801 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs., (Weston Solutions, Inc. and Weston Solutions, Inc. ((Agent/Contractor)) terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-05351-AKH (yv)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7800 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. (As further set forth in this Order.) Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastophe, Inc. (225 Liberty Street (Two World Financial Center)), Weston Solutions, Inc., Weston Solutions, Inc. (250 Vesey Street (Four World Financial Center)), Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastophe, Inc. and Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastophe, Inc. (250 Vesey Street (Four World Financial Center)) terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-09674-AKH(cf)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7798 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7797 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(l)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (js)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7796 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(l)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (js)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7795 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-04459-AKH(mro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7794 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01476-AKH(mro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7792 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and The dismissal is without costs., (Weston Solutions Inc. (Agent/Contractor) terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01601-AKH (yv)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7791 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01576-AKH(mro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7790 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:08-cv-02578-AKH(mro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7789 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-01572-AKH(mro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7788 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-04456-AKH(mro)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7787 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7786 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal ofdocuments and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7785 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7784 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7783 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7782 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon- Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ama)
July 25, 2018