Nike, Inc. v. Lululemon Athletica Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nike, Inc.
Defendant: Lululemon Athletica Inc., CURIOUSER PRODUCTS INC. D/B/A MIRROR and Curiouser Products Inc. doing business as Mirror
Case Number: 1:2022cv00082
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Referring Judge: Ona T Wang
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 35 ANSWER to #34 Amended Complaint,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Curiouser Products Inc., Lululemon Athletica Inc...(Mooney, Kyle)
February 4, 2022 Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against Curiouser Products Inc., Lululemon Athletica Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Nike, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fogarty Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Van Nort Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - US Patent No. 8620413, #4 Exhibit 4 - US Patent No. 9278256, #5 Exhibit 5 - US Patent No. 9259615, #6 Exhibit 6 - US Patent No. 10188930, #7 Exhibit 7 - US Patent No. 10232220, #8 Exhibit 8 - US Patent No. 10923225, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mirror Website - Accessories, #10 Exhibit 10 - Mirror Website - App and TV, #11 Exhibit 11 - Mirror Website - Classes and programs, #12 Exhibit 12 - Mirror Website - Mirror Troubleshoots, #13 Exhibit 13 - Mirror Website - Product information and Tech Specs, #14 Exhibit 14 - Mirror Website - Using The Mirror).(Renk, Christopher)
February 4, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen Patricia Duffy on behalf of Nike, Inc...(Duffy, Kathleen)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/11/2022 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 2/3/2022) (tg)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/26/2022) (vfr)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Bonnie Phan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Bridgette C. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Michael J. Gershoni to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Diek O. Van Nort to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Jennifer J. Schmidt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Stefani E. Shanberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
January 24, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #23 MOTION for Bridgette C. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25618236. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
January 24, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 MOTION for Bonnie Phan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25619752. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
January 21, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION for Bonnie Phan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25619752. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nike, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Phan, Bonnie)
January 21, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Bridgette C. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25618236. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nike, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Boyd, Bridgette)
January 21, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for Michael J. Gershoni to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25614509. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
January 20, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Michael J. Gershoni to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25614509. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nike, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Gershoni, Michael)
January 18, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Diek O. Van Nort to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25597901. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Curiouser Products Inc., Lululemon Athletica Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diek O. Van Nort in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Van Nort, Diek)
January 18, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Jennifer J. Schmidt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25597801. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Curiouser Products Inc., Lululemon Athletica Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer J. Schmidt in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Schmidt, Jennifer)
January 18, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Stefani E. Shanberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25597740. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Curiouser Products Inc., Lululemon Athletica Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stefani E. Shanberg in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Shanberg, Stefani)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Aaron P. Bowling to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Michael J. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Christopher J. Renk to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
January 18, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for Jennifer J. Schmidt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25597801. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 18, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Stefani E. Shanberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25597740. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 18, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Diek O. Van Nort to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25597901. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 14, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Curiouser Products Inc., Lululemon Athletica Inc...(Mooney, Kyle)
January 14, 2022 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Curiouser Products Inc., Lululemon Athletica Inc...(Mooney, Kyle)
January 14, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Michael J. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25582255. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
January 14, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Christopher J. Renk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25582141. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
January 14, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Aaron P. Bowling to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25582309. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
January 13, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Aaron P. Bowling to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25582309. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nike, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Bowling, Aaron)
January 13, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Michael J. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25582255. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nike, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Harris, Michael)
January 13, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Christopher J. Renk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25582141. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nike, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Renk, Christopher)
January 7, 2022 Filing 10 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(vf)
January 6, 2022 Filing 9 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sebba, Michael)
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lululemon Athletica Inc.. (sj)
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Curiouser Products Inc...(sj)
January 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Jonathan Sebba. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Curiouser Products Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
January 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Jonathan Sebba. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
January 6, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
January 6, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
January 6, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 5, 2022 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sebba, Michael)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Nike, Inc...(Sebba, Michael)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LULULEMON ATHLETICA INC., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Nike, Inc...(Sebba, Michael)
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CURIOUSER PRODUCTS INC. D/B/A MIRROR, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Nike, Inc...(Sebba, Michael)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sebba, Michael) Modified on 1/6/2022 (sj).
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CURIOUSER PRODUCTS INC. D/B/A MIRROR, Lululemon Athletica Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25544101)Document filed by Nike, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 1 - Fogarty Letter, #2 2 - Van Nort Letter, #3 3 - US Patent No. 8620413, #4 4 - US Patent No. 9278256, #5 5 - US Patent No. 9259615, #6 6 - US Patent No. 10188930, #7 7 - US Patent No. 10232220, #8 8 - US Patent No. 10923225, #9 9 - Mirror Website - Accessories, #10 10 - Mirror Website - App and TV, #11 11 - Mirror Website - Classes and programs, #12 12 - Mirror Website - Mirror Troubleshoots, #13 13 - Mirror Website - Product information and Tech Specs, #14 14 - Mirror Website - Using The Mirror).(Sebba, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nike, Inc. v. Lululemon Athletica Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nike, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Jonathan Sebba
Represented By: Christopher J. Renk
Represented By: Aaron Patrick Bowling
Represented By: Bonnie Phan
Represented By: Bridgette Boyd
Represented By: Kathleen Patricia Duffy
Represented By: Michael Joshua Gershoni
Represented By: Michael J Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lululemon Athletica Inc.
Represented By: Kyle W. Mooney
Represented By: Stefani Elise Shanberg
Represented By: Diek Van Nort
Represented By: Jennifer Jeanne Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURIOUSER PRODUCTS INC. D/B/A MIRROR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curiouser Products Inc. doing business as Mirror
Represented By: Kyle W. Mooney
Represented By: Stefani Elise Shanberg
Represented By: Diek Van Nort
Represented By: Jennifer Jeanne Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?