Union Insurance Company, Ltd. et al v. M/V One Apus et al
Plaintiff: Union Insurance Company, Ltd., Taian Insurance Company, Ltd., The First Insurance Company, Ltd., Shinkong Insurance Company, Ltd., Cathay Century Insurance Company, Ltd. and Taiwan Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Ltd.
Defendant: M/V ONE Apus, Soonest Express, Inc., Soonest Express (HK) Co., Ltd., Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation, Chidori Ship Holdings, LLC, Jessica Ship Holding, S.A., Ocean Network Express, PTE and Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp
Case Number: 1:2022cv03836
Filed: May 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James L Cott
Referring Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 ad Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Tag-Along Action With Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation re MDL No. 3028. Document filed by Cathay Century Insurance Company, Ltd., Shinkong Insurance Company, Ltd., Taian Insurance Company, Ltd., Taiwan Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Ltd., The First Insurance Company, Ltd., Union Insurance Company, Ltd...(Vergara, Rafael)
June 6, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,., CROSSCLAIM against Chidori Ship Holdings, LLC, Jessica Ship Holding, S.A., M/V One Apus. Document filed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp..(Wolfson, Garth)
June 6, 2022 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp..(Wolfson, Garth)
May 24, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ocean Network Express, PTE waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. Document filed by Taiwan Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Ltd.; The First Insurance Company, Ltd.; Taian Insurance Company, Ltd.; Shinkong Insurance Company, Ltd.; Union Insurance Company, Ltd. ; Cathay Century Insurance Company, Ltd...(Vergara, Rafael)
May 24, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. Document filed by Taiwan Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Ltd.; The First Insurance Company, Ltd.; Taian Insurance Company, Ltd.; Shinkong Insurance Company, Ltd.; Union Insurance Company, Ltd. ; Cathay Century Insurance Company, Ltd...(Vergara, Rafael)
May 24, 2022 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Union Insurance Company, Ltd...(Vergara, Rafael)
May 24, 2022 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The First Insurance Company, Ltd...(Vergara, Rafael)
May 24, 2022 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Taiwan Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Ltd...(Vergara, Rafael)
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Taian Insurance Company, Ltd...(Vergara, Rafael)
May 24, 2022 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Shinkong Textile Company, Ltd. for Shinkong Insurance Company, Ltd.. Document filed by Shinkong Insurance Company, Ltd...(Vergara, Rafael)
May 24, 2022 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Cathay Financial Holding Company, Ltd. for Cathay Century Insurance Company, Ltd.. Document filed by Cathay Century Insurance Company, Ltd...(Vergara, Rafael)
May 17, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney Rafael Vergara to RE-FILE Document #5 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Each document should be filed separately) (lb)
May 16, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Cathay Financial Holding Company, Ltd. for Cathay Century Insurance Company, Ltd.; Other Affiliate Shinkong Textile Company, Ltd. for Shinkong Insurance Company, Ltd.. Document filed by Cathay Century Insurance Company, Ltd., Shinkong Insurance Company, Ltd., Taian Insurance Company, Ltd., Taiwan Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Ltd., The First Insurance Company, Ltd., Union Insurance Company, Ltd...(Vergara, Rafael) Modified on 5/17/2022 (lb).
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) and All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/13/2022) (rro)
May 12, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Rafael Vergara. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 12:635; Dollar Demand $2,363,553,000; County code XX Out of State;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1333; the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (pc)
May 12, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Rafael Vergara. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: M/V ONE Apus, Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (pc)
May 12, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 12, 2022 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 12, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 12, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Rafael Vergara to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the corporate disclosure statement is not correct;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
May 11, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Cathay Financial Holding Company, Ltd. for Cathay Century Insurance Company, Ltd.; Other Affiliate Shinkong Textile Company, Ltd. for Shinkong Insurance Company, Ltd.. Document filed by Cathay Century Insurance Company, Ltd., Shinkong Insurance Company, Ltd., Taian Insurance Company, Ltd., Taiwan Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Ltd., The First Insurance Company, Ltd., Union Insurance Company, Ltd...(Vergara, Rafael) Modified on 5/12/2022 (lb).
May 11, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Vergara, Rafael)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chidori Ship Holdings, LLC, Jessica Ship Holding, S.A., M/V ONE Apus, Ocean Network Express, PTE, Soonest Express (HK) Co., Ltd., Soonest Express, Inc., Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26132861)Document filed by Taiwan Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Ltd., The First Insurance Company, Ltd., Taian Insurance Company, Ltd., Shinkong Insurance Company, Ltd., Union Insurance Company, Ltd., Cathay Century Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bill of lading HKGCHI20C042, #2 Exhibit B - Bill of lading HKGCHI20C047, #3 Exhibit C - Bill of lading HKGCHI20C048, #4 Exhibit D - Bill of lading HKGCHI20C049, #5 Exhibit E - Bill of lading YMLUW302496347, #6 Exhibit F - Bill of lading YMLUW302496447, #7 Exhibit G - subrogation receipt).(Vergara, Rafael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Insurance Company, Ltd. et al v. M/V One Apus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Insurance Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Rafael Vergara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taian Insurance Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Rafael Vergara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The First Insurance Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Rafael Vergara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shinkong Insurance Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Rafael Vergara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathay Century Insurance Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Rafael Vergara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taiwan Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Rafael Vergara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V ONE Apus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soonest Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soonest Express (HK) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chidori Ship Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Ship Holding, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Network Express, PTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp
Represented By: Garth S. Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?